Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 4245 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17651 Week
» 70667 Month
» 190194 Year
» 3217047 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Depot: Stewarts Lane
Depot Details
Depot Name |
Stewarts Lane |
Depot Codes |
Code | From | To | BAT | 1875 | 31/01/1950 | 73A | 01/02/1950 | 31/05/1962 | 75D | 01/06/1962 | 05/05/1973 | SL | 06/05/1973 | |
|
Big 4 Company |
SR |
1947 Directions |
The shed is in a maze of lines between Wandsworth Road and
Battersea Park Stations.
Turn left outside Battersea Park Station along Battersea Park Road.
Turn right into Stewarts Road immediately after crossing the railway
bridge, and right again into Corruna Terrace. A footbridge leads to
the shed from the end of this short cul-de-sac. Walking time 10 minutes.
Note.-This area was heavily blitzed, and some of the roads may
not be too easy to identify. |
Popup Maps (New Window) |
25 Inch (1892-1914) OS (1:25,000) (1937-1961) OS 7th Series 1 inch (1:63,360) |
Chronology |
Date | Event | 1875 | Change of code to BAT | 01/02/1950 | Change of code to 73A | 01/06/1962 | Change of code to 75D | 06/05/1973 | Change of code to SL |
|
|
|