Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 762 Today
» 854 Yesterday
» 3448 Week
» 4338 Month
» 312319 Year
» 1196700 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Templecombe (S&D)


Depot Details
Depot Name Templecombe (S&D)
Depot Codes
CodeFromTo
22D187731/01/1950
71H01/02/195031/01/1958
82G01/02/195830/09/1963
83G01/10/196303/1966
Date Opened 31/08/1863
Date Closed 03/1966
Pre Grouping Company SDR
Big 4 Company LMS
British Railways Region WR
1947 Directions The shed is on the east side of the S. & D. line north of the point where it goes under the main S.R. line. The yard is visible from the S. & D. line.

Turn left outside the SR. Station along the approach road. Turn left under the railway bridge, and first right over the S. & D. line. A broad path leads to the shed from the left hand side of this road. Walking time 10 minutes.
Popup Maps (New Window) Street Map (1:25,000)
Town Map (1:50,000)
Road Map (1:100,000)
Road Map (1:200,000)
County Map (1:500,000)
Regional Map (1:1,000,000)
Chronology
DateEvent
31/08/1863Depot opened
1877Change of code to 22D
01/02/1950Change of code to 71H
01/02/1958Change of code to 82G
01/10/1963Change of code to 83G
03/1966Depot closed