Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 225 Today
» 839 Yesterday
» 225 Week
» 18546 Month
» 106738 Year
» 991119 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Toton


Depot Details
Depot Name Toton
Depot Codes
CodeFromTo
17187531/12/1922
M1701/01/192331/01/1935
18A01/02/193502/09/1963
16A01/09/196305/05/1973
TO06/05/1973
Date Opened 1870
Pre Grouping Company MR
Big 4 Company LMS
British Railways Region LMR
1947 Directions The shed is on the west side of the main line between Long Eaton and Sandiacre Stations. The yard is partially visible from the line.

From Sandiacre Station.
Turn left outside the station, and left again almost immediately into a small goods yard. A cinder path runs parallel to the line from the end of this cobbled goods yard, The shed entrance is on the left hand side. Walking time 15 minutes.

From Long Eaton Station.
Turn right outside the station into Station Street. Turn right again into Cross Street, and continue into Waverley Street. Turn left across The Green into Derby Road, and almost immediately right into Cranmer Street. Turn second right into Worrall Avenue, and a cinder path leads parallel to the line from a gate at the end of this avenue. Continue along this path for about 5 mile, and the shed entrance is on the right hand side. Walking time 30 minutes.
Popup Maps (New Window) Street Map (1:25,000)
Town Map (1:50,000)
Road Map (1:100,000)
Road Map (1:200,000)
County Map (1:500,000)
Regional Map (1:1,000,000)
Chronology
DateEvent
1870Depot opened
1875Change of code to 17
01/01/1923Change of code to M17
01/01/1935Change of code to 18A
01/09/1963Change of code to 16A
12/1965Closed to steam locomotives
06/05/1973Change of code to TO