Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 421 Today
» 1004 Yesterday
» 3564 Week
» 13734 Month
» 291530 Year
» 1175911 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Trafford Park (LMS)


Depot Details
Depot Name Trafford Park (LMS)
Depot Codes
CodeFromTo
19G187531/01/1950
13A01/01/195021/05/1950
9E22/05/195031/12/1956
17F01/01/195731/03/1958
9E01/04/195829/02/1968
Date Closed 04/03/1968
Pre Grouping Company MR
Big 4 Company LMS
British Railways Region LMR
1947 Directions The shed is on the north side of the C.L.C. line east of Trafford Park and Stretford Station. The yard is not visible from the line.
Turn right outside the west exit of Warwick Road Station. Go along Warwick Road, and continue into Warwick Road North (crossing the main Chester Road). Turn left into Railway Road, and right along a cinder path opposite the end of Ravenswood Road. This path leads to the shed.
Walking time 15 minutes.
Note. This is a joint L.N.E. and L.M.S. shed.
See also under Manchester.
Popup Maps (New Window) Street Map (1:25,000)
Town Map (1:50,000)
Road Map (1:100,000)
Road Map (1:200,000)
County Map (1:500,000)
Regional Map (1:1,000,000)
Chronology
DateEvent
1875Change of code to 19G
01/01/1950Change of code to 13A
01/05/1950Change of code to 9E
01/01/1957Change of code to 17F
01/04/1958Change of code to 9E
04/03/1968Depot closed