Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 2632 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16038 Week
» 69054 Month
» 188581 Year
» 3215434 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Depot: Tunbridge Wells West
Depot Details
Depot Name |
Tunbridge Wells West |
Depot Codes |
Code | From | To | TWW | 1875 | 31/01/1950 | 75F | 01/02/1950 | 31/08/1963 | TW | 06/05/1973 | |
|
Big 4 Company |
SR |
1947 Directions |
The shed is on the north side of the line at the west end of the
station. The yard is visible from the line. The shed entrance is a gate
in Tunbridge Wells West Station yard.
Note.~A bus service connects Tunbridge Wells Central and West
Stations. |
Popup Maps (New Window) |
25 Inch (1892-1914) OS (1:25,000) (1937-1961) OS 7th Series 1 inch (1:63,360) |
Chronology |
Date | Event | 1875 | Change of code to TWW | 01/02/1950 | Change of code to 75F | 06/05/1973 | Change of code to TW |
|
|
|