Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 306 Today
» 911 Yesterday
» 306 Week
» 14210 Month
» 322191 Year
» 1206572 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Tyseley


Depot Details
Depot Name Tyseley
Depot Codes
CodeFromTo
174187531/01/1946
TYS187531/01/1950
84E01/01/195031/08/1963
2A01/09/196305/05/1973
TS06/05/1973
Date Opened 06/1908
Pre Grouping Company GWR
Big 4 Company GWR
British Railways Region LMR
GWR Division WOLVERHAMPTON
1947 Directions The shed is on the west side of the line north of the station. The yard is not visible from the line.

Turn right outside the station, and fork right at the end of the bridge into Wharfdale Road. Continue into Warwick Road, and the shed entrance is on the right hand side. Walking time 5 minutes. See also under Birmingham.
Popup Maps (New Window) Street Map (1:25,000)
Town Map (1:50,000)
Road Map (1:100,000)
Road Map (1:200,000)
County Map (1:500,000)
Regional Map (1:1,000,000)
Chronology
DateEvent
1875Change of code to TYS
1875Change of code to 174
06/1908Depot opened
01/01/1950Change of code to 84E
01/09/1963Change of code to 2A
07/11/1966Closed to steam locomotives
06/05/1973Change of code to TS