Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 2026 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15432 Week
» 68448 Month
» 187975 Year
» 3214828 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Depot: Uttoxeter
Depot Details
Depot Name |
Uttoxeter |
Depot Codes |
Code | From | To | 15U | 01/01/1875 | 31/12/1922 | W15U | 01/01/1923 | 31/01/1935 | 5F | 01/01/1923 | 07/12/1964 |
|
Date Closed |
07/12/1964 |
Big 4 Company |
LMS |
1947 Directions |
The shed is in the middle of a triangle of lines, of which the station
forms two sides. The yard is visible from the Derby line.
A cinder path leads to the shed from the eastern end of the down
platform on the Stoke-Derby line. Walking time under 5 minutes.
|
Popup Maps (New Window) |
25 Inch (1892-1914) OS (1:25,000) (1937-1961) OS 7th Series 1 inch (1:63,360) |
Chronology |
Date | Event | 1875 | Change of code to 5F | 07/12/1964 | Depot closed |
|
|
|