Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 90 Today
» 1085 Yesterday
» 6146 Week
» 20723 Month
» 383968 Year
» 460555 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Wakefield


Depot Details
Depot Name Wakefield
Depot Codes
CodeFromTo
C601/01/192331/01/1935
25A01/02/193531/08/1956
56A01/09/195631/05/1967
Date Opened 1847
Date Closed 03/06/1967
Pre Grouping Company LYR
Big 4 Company LMS
British Railways Region LMR
1947 Directions The shed is on the east side of the Pontefract line, running south from the east end of Kirkgate Station. The yard is visible from the line.

From Wakefield Kirkgate Station.
Turn right outside the station along Calder Vale Road, and turn sharp left over Wakefield Bridge. Fork left into Doncaster Road, and turn left into Elmtree Street. A footbridge leads from the end of this cul-de-sac to the shed. Walking time 20 minutes.

From Wakefield Westgate Station.
Turn left outside the station into Westgate. Turn right into Kirkgate, and continue as above. Walking time 35 minutes.
Popup Maps (New Window) Street Map (1:25,000)
Town Map (1:50,000)
Road Map (1:100,000)
Road Map (1:200,000)
County Map (1:500,000)
Regional Map (1:1,000,000)
Chronology
DateEvent
1847Depot opened
01/01/1923Change of code to C6
01/01/1935Change of code to 25A
01/09/1956Change of code to 56A
03/06/1967Depot closed