Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 3148 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16554 Week
» 69570 Month
» 189097 Year
» 3215950 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Depot: Warwick
Depot Details
Depot Name |
Warwick |
Depot Codes |
Code | From | To | 11 | 01/08/1920 | 31/10/1921 | 2E | 01/01/1923 | 30/06/1950 | 2C | 01/07/1950 | 31/10/1958 |
|
Big 4 Company |
LMS |
1947 Directions |
The shed is on the west side of the line north of Warwick Milverton
Station. The yard is partially visible from the line.
From Warwick Milverton Station.
Turn right outside Warwick Milverton L.M.S. Station along
Warwick New Road. Turn sharp right into Rugby Road, and second
left into Milverton Road. The shed entrance is a door on the right hand
side of this road. Walking time 5 minutes.
From Warwick G.W. Station.
Go straight ahead outside the station into Station Road, and continue
into Coventry Road. Turn sharp left into Coten End, continue into
Emscote Road, and fork left into Rugby Road. Turn second left into
Milverton Road, and the shed is on the right hand side. Walking time
25 minutes. |
Popup Maps (New Window) |
25 Inch (1892-1914) OS (1:25,000) (1937-1961) OS 7th Series 1 inch (1:63,360) |
Chronology |
Date | Event | 1875 | Change of code to 2E | 01/07/1950 | Change of code to 2C |
|
|
|