Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 1488 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14894 Week
» 67910 Month
» 187437 Year
» 3214290 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Depot: Wellington
Depot Details
Depot Name |
Wellington |
Depot Codes |
Code | From | To | WLN (184) | 1875 | 31/01/1950 | 84H | 01/02/1950 | 31/08/1963 | 2M | 01/09/1963 | 31/07/1964 |
|
Big 4 Company |
GWR |
GWR Division |
WOLVERHAMPTON |
1947 Directions |
The shed is on the east side of the line south of the station. The
yard is visible from the line.
Turn left outside the station, and left into Victoria Road. The shed
entrance is on the left just past the railway underbridge. Walking time
5 minutes. |
Popup Maps (New Window) |
25 Inch (1892-1914) OS (1:25,000) (1937-1961) OS 7th Series 1 inch (1:63,360) |
Chronology |
Date | Event | 1875 | Change of code to 184 | 1875 | Change of code to WLN | 01/02/1950 | Change of code to 84H | 01/09/1963 | Change of code to 2M |
|
|
|