Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 196 Today
» 844 Yesterday
» 4462 Week
» 16240 Month
» 305632 Year
» 816734 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: West Auckland


Depot Details
Depot Name West Auckland
Depot Codes
CodeFromTo
AUK187531/01/1950
51F01/02/195002/02/1964
Date Opened 1887
Date Closed 02/02/1964
Pre Grouping Company NER
Big 4 Company LNER
British Railways Region ER
Information Depot was close between 13th April 1931 and July 8th 1935 where it took on the allocations of Shildon and Wear Valley Junction depots
1947 Directions The shed is on the west side of the line between West Auckland and Bishop Auckland Stations. The yard is visible from the line.

From West Auckland Station.
Turn right outside West Auckland Station along the main Bishop Auckland road. About a mile further on turn right along the main Shildon road. A cinder path leads to the shed from the right hand side of this road, just before the railway bridge.
Walking time 25 minutes.

From Bishop Auckland Station.
Turn right outside Bishop Auckland Station along the approach road and right into the main West Auckland Road. Continue for about 1½ miles and turn left into the main Shildon Road.
Walking time 40 minutes.
Popup Maps (New Window) Street Map (1:25,000)
Town Map (1:50,000)
Road Map (1:100,000)
Road Map (1:200,000)
County Map (1:500,000)
Regional Map (1:1,000,000)
Chronology
DateEvent
1875Change of code to AUK
1887Depot opened
01/02/1950Change of code to 51F
02/02/1964Depot closed