Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 87 Today
» 1224 Yesterday
» 3899 Week
» 33397 Month
» 370243 Year
» 1591808 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Weymouth Radipole (GWR)


Depot Details
Depot Name Weymouth Radipole (GWR)
Depot Codes
CodeFromTo
162187531/01/1946
WEY187531/01/1950
82F01/02/195031/01/1958
71G01/02/195831/08/1963
70G01/09/196330/06/1967
Date Closed 09/07/1967
Pre Grouping Company GWR
Big 4 Company GWR
British Railways Region WR
GWR Division BRISTOL
Information Took over servicing and stabling of SR locomotives from January 1939 after the closure of the ex-LSWR depot.
1947 Directions The shed is on the east side of the line north of the station. The yard is visible from the line.
Turn left outside the station into Queen’s Street, and left into Ranelagh Street. Continue along the footpath running parallel to the railway from the end of this road. Bear right into Hanover Road at the end of the footpath. Turn left into Alexandra Road and follow this road round to the right. Turn left into Dorchester Road (A37), and left into a narrow road almost opposite the end of Fernhill Avenue. A cinder path leads through the allotments at the end of this road to the shed.
Walking time 20 minutes.
Popup Maps (New Window) 25 Inch (1892-1914)
OS (1:25,000) (1937-1961)
OS 7th Series 1 inch (1:63,360)
Chronology
DateEvent
1875Change of code to 162
1875Change of code to WEY
01/02/1950Change of code to 82F
01/02/1958Change of code to 71G
01/09/1963Change of code to 70G
09/07/1967Depot closed