Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 103 Today
» 832 Yesterday
» 2796 Week
» 23778 Month
» 165732 Year
» 1050113 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Woodford Halse


Depot Details
Depot Name Woodford Halse
Depot Codes
CodeFromTo
WFD187531/01/1950
38E01/02/195031/01/1958
2G01/02/195831/03/1958
2F01/04/195831/08/1963
1G01/09/196331/05/1965
Date Opened 1897
Date Closed 14/06/1965
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big 4 Company LNER
British Railways Region ER
1947 Directions The shed is on the east side of the main line north of Woodford and Hinton Station. The yard is visible from the line.
Turn right outside Woodford and Hinton Station, under the railway bridge. Turn left into a cinder path running parallel to the railway. The entrance to this path is between a block of houses and the railway. Continue along this path and cross the road at the end. Another cinder path leads from the opposite side of this road to the shed.
Walking time 15 minutes.
Popup Maps (New Window) Street Map (1:25,000)
Town Map (1:50,000)
Road Map (1:100,000)
Road Map (1:200,000)
County Map (1:500,000)
Regional Map (1:1,000,000)
Chronology
DateEvent
1875Change of code to WFD
1897Depot opened
01/02/1950Change of code to 38E
01/02/1958Change of code to 2G
01/04/1958Change of code to 2F
01/09/1963Change of code to 1G
14/06/1965Depot closed