Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 111 Today
» 950 Yesterday
» 111 Week
» 7295 Month
» 315276 Year
» 1199657 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Workington


Depot Details
Depot Name Workington
Depot Codes
CodeFromTo
3201/07/187731/12/1922
W3201/01/192331/01/1935
12D01/02/193530/09/1955
12C01/10/195531/03/1958
11B01/04/195831/05/1960
12F01/06/196031/08/1963
12D01/09/196331/12/1967
WK06/05/1973
Date Closed 01/01/1968
Big 4 Company LMS
1947 Directions The shed is on the east side of the line south of Workington Main Station. The yard is visible from the line.

Go ahead across the station yard, and turn right into a narrow street (the middle of three turnings). Bear right again into a short cul-de-sac, and continue into a cinder path. The shed entrance is a gate on the right hand side. Walking time 5 minutes.
Popup Maps (New Window) Street Map (1:25,000)
Town Map (1:50,000)
Road Map (1:100,000)
Road Map (1:200,000)
County Map (1:500,000)
Regional Map (1:1,000,000)
Chronology
DateEvent
1875Change of code to 12D
01/10/1955Change of code to 12C
01/04/1958Change of code to 11B
01/06/1960Change of code to 12F
01/09/1963Change of code to 12D
01/01/1968Depot closed
06/05/1973Change of code to WK