Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 772 Today
» 1011 Yesterday
» 772 Week
» 18108 Month
» 295904 Year
» 1180285 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Wrexham Rhosddu


Depot Details
Depot Name Wrexham Rhosddu
Depot Codes
CodeFromTo
WRX187531/01/1950
6E01/02/195031/01/1958
84K01/02/195831/12/1959
Date Opened 01/01/1866
Date Closed 04/01/1960
Pre Grouping Company WMCQR
Big 4 Company LNER
British Railways Region LMR
Information Originally opened by the Wrexham, Mold & Connah's Quay Railway, the depot became a Great Central shed on the acquisition of the former company by the latter. In 1923, the GCR was taken over by the LNER which resulted in the curious paradox of a Welsh depot belonging to the London and North Eastern Railway!
1947 Directions The shed is on the west side of the line north of Wrexham Exchange Station. At this point the L.N.E. and G.W. lines are running parallel, and the yard is visible from both lines.
Turn right outside the main entrance to the G.W.R. Station, and turn right into Mold Road crossing the railway. Leave the down side of the G.W.R. Station or the L.N.E. Station by the joint approach, and turn right into Mold Road. Turn first right along a road running parallel to the railway. A broad path leads up a short bank to the shed, opposite the end of this road.
Walking time 10 minutes.
Popup Maps (New Window) Street Map (1:25,000)
Town Map (1:50,000)
Road Map (1:100,000)
Road Map (1:200,000)
County Map (1:500,000)
Regional Map (1:1,000,000)
Chronology
DateEvent
01/01/1866Depot opened
1875Change of code to WRX
01/02/1950Change of code to 6E
01/02/1958Change of code to 84K
04/01/1960Depot closed