Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 1274 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 7058 Week
» 28447 Month
» 147974 Year
» 3174827 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Depot: Yeovil Town
Depot Details
Depot Name |
Yeovil Town |
Depot Codes |
Code | From | To | YEO | 1875 | 31/01/1950 | 72C | 01/02/1950 | 31/08/1963 | 83E | 01/09/1963 | 31/05/1965 |
|
Date Opened |
19/07/1860 |
Date Closed |
06/1965 |
Pre Grouping Company |
EYR |
Big 4 Company |
SR |
British Railways Region |
SR |
1947 Directions |
The shed is on the south side of the line west of the station. The
yard is visible from the line.
Turn right outside the station, and right again over the railway
bridge. The shed entrance is on the right hand side just past the bridge.
Walking time 5 minutes. |
Popup Maps (New Window) |
25 Inch (1892-1914) OS (1:25,000) (1937-1961) OS 7th Series 1 inch (1:63,360) |
Chronology |
Date | Event | 1875 | Change of code to YEO | 01/02/1950 | Change of code to 72C | 01/09/1963 | Change of code to 83E |
|
|
|