Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 90 Today
» 1085 Yesterday
» 6146 Week
» 20723 Month
» 383968 Year
» 460555 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: York (North)


Depot Details
Depot Name York (North)
Depot Codes
CodeFromTo
YK187531/01/1950
50A01/02/195030/11/1967
55B01/12/196705/05/1973
YK06/05/1973
Date Opened 1878
Date Closed 03/1984
Pre Grouping Company NER
Big 4 Company LNER
British Railways Region ER
1947 Directions The shed is on the west side of the main line north of the station. The yard is visible from the line.
Turn left outside the station along Station Road, and first left into Leeman Road. Continue under a long railway bridge, and the shed entrance is on the right hand side.
Walking time 10 minutes.
Popup Maps (New Window) Street Map (1:25,000)
Town Map (1:50,000)
Road Map (1:100,000)
Road Map (1:200,000)
County Map (1:500,000)
Regional Map (1:1,000,000)
Chronology
DateEvent
1875Change of code to YK
1878Depot opened
01/02/1950Change of code to 50A
25/06/1967Closed to steam locomotives
01/12/1967Change of code to 55B
06/05/1973Change of code to YK
03/1984Depot closed