Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 196 Today
» 844 Yesterday
» 4462 Week
» 16240 Month
» 305632 Year
» 816734 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Hull Botanic Gardens


Depot Details
Depot Name Hull Botanic Gardens
Depot Codes
CodeFromTo
HLB187531/01/1950
53B01/02/195031/12/1959
50C01/01/196005/05/1973
BG06/05/1973
Date Opened 1901
Pre Grouping Company NER
Big 4 Company LNER
British Railways Region ER
1947 Directions The shed is on the east side of the line south of Botanic Gardens Station. The yard is visible from the line.
Cross the main road (Springbank) outside Botanic Gardens Station, and continue into Derringham Street. Turn right into Kimberley Street. This is a cul-de-sac, and the shed entrance is at the end.
Walking time 5 minutes.
For a route from Paragon Station see under Springhead.
Popup Maps (New Window) Street Map (1:25,000)
Town Map (1:50,000)
Road Map (1:100,000)
Road Map (1:200,000)
County Map (1:500,000)
Regional Map (1:1,000,000)
Chronology
DateEvent
1875Change of code to HLB
1901Depot opened
01/02/1950Change of code to 53B
13/06/1959Closed to steam locomotives
01/01/1960Change of code to 50C
06/05/1973Change of code to BG