Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 1631 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15037 Week
» 68053 Month
» 187580 Year
» 3214433 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Depot: Reedsmouth
Depot Details
Depot Name |
Reedsmouth |
Depot Codes |
Code | From | To | Twd | 01/08/1924 | 31/12/1949 | 52c | 01/01/1949 | 15/09/1952 |
|
Date Opened |
01/07/1862 |
Date Closed |
15/09/1952 |
Pre Grouping Company |
BCR |
Big 4 Company |
LNER |
British Railways Region |
ScR |
Popup Maps (New Window) |
25 Inch (1892-1914) OS (1:25,000) (1937-1961) OS 7th Series 1 inch (1:63,360) |
Chronology |
Date | Event | 01/07/1862 | Depot opened | 01/08/1924 | Change of code to Twd | 01/01/1949 | Change of code to 52c | 15/09/1952 | Depot closed |
|
|
|