Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 6 Online
» 49 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17852 Week
» 70868 Month
» 190395 Year
» 3217248 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Depot: Tewkesbury
Depot Details
Depot Name |
Tewkesbury |
Depot Codes |
Code | From | To | 7T | 1875 | 31/12/1910 | 7a | 01/01/1911 | 31/12/1922 | M7T | 01/01/1923 | 31/01/1935 | 22b | 01/01/1923 | 31/01/1958 | 85e | 01/02/1958 | 09/09/1960 | 85c | 10/09/1960 | 07/09/1962 |
|
Date Opened |
21/07/1840 |
Date Closed |
07/09/1962 |
Pre Grouping Company |
MR |
Big 4 Company |
LMS |
British Railways Region |
LMR |
Popup Maps (New Window) |
25 Inch (1892-1914) OS (1:25,000) (1937-1961) OS 7th Series 1 inch (1:63,360) |
Chronology |
Date | Event | 21/07/1840 | Depot opened | 1875 | Change of code to 7T | 01/01/1911 | Change of code to 7a | 01/01/1923 | Change of code to M7T | 01/01/1935 | Change of code to 22b | 01/02/1958 | Change of code to 85e | 10/09/1960 | Change of code to 85c | 07/09/1962 | Depot closed |
|
|
|