Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 680 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14086 Week
» 67102 Month
» 186629 Year
» 3213482 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Depot: Thornbury
Depot Details
Depot Name |
Thornbury |
Depot Codes |
Code | From | To | 8Th | 1875 | 31/12/1910 | 8b | 01/01/1911 | 31/12/1922 | M8Th | 01/01/1923 | 31/01/1935 | 22a | 01/02/1935 | 19/06/1944 |
|
Date Opened |
02/09/1872 |
Date Closed |
19/06/1944 |
Pre Grouping Company |
MR |
Big 4 Company |
LMS |
Popup Maps (New Window) |
25 Inch (1892-1914) OS (1:25,000) (1937-1961) OS 7th Series 1 inch (1:63,360) |
Chronology |
Date | Event | 02/09/1872 | Depot opened | 1875 | Change of code to 8Th | 01/01/1911 | Change of code to 8b | 01/01/1923 | Change of code to M8Th | 01/01/1935 | Change of code to 22a | 19/06/1944 | Depot closed |
|
|
|