Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 26 Online
» 2130 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19933 Week
» 72949 Month
» 192476 Year
» 3219329 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Depot: Brecon
Depot Details
Depot Name |
Brecon |
Depot Codes |
Code | From | To | 5 | 1875 | 31/12/1922 | BCN (39) | 1875 | 31/01/1950 | M5 | 01/01/1923 | 01/01/1935 | 4c | 01/02/1935 | 31/01/1950 | 89B | 01/02/1950 | 09/09/1960 | 88K | 10/09/1960 | 30/11/1962 |
|
Date Opened |
01/05/1863 |
Date Closed |
31/12/1962 |
Pre Grouping Company |
BMR |
Big 4 Company |
LMS |
British Railways Region |
WR |
GWR Division |
CENTRAL WALES |
1947 Directions |
The shed is on the south side of the line east of the station. The
yard is visible from the line.
Turn left outside the station along the approach road. Continue
into Camden Road, and turn left into Free Street. Turn left into Watton
and left into the goods yard approach road. This leads to the shed.
Walking time 10 minutes. |
Popup Maps (New Window) |
25 Inch (1892-1914) OS (1:25,000) (1937-1961) OS 7th Series 1 inch (1:63,360) |
Chronology |
Date | Event | 01/05/1863 | Depot opened | 1875 | Change of code to 5 | 01/01/1923 | Change of code to M5 | 01/01/1935 | Change of code to 4c | 01/02/1950 | Change of code to 89B | 10/09/1960 | Change of code to 88K | 31/12/1962 | Depot closed |
|
|
|