Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 224 Today
» 1292 Yesterday
» 2742 Week
» 22387 Month
» 57029 Year
» 1278594 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Aberbeeg


Type Class Wheels Period Date Number Event Code Depot Length of Stay Notes
Steam 45xx 2-6-2T 4w/e 22/07/1939 4541 Transfer in from:        
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 22/07/1939 6654 Transfer in from:        
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 03/11/1945 3726 Transfer in from:        
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 01/12/1945 3716 Transfer in from:        
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 01/12/1945 3776 Transfer in from:        
Steam 42xx 2-8-0T 4w/e 01/12/1945 4222 Transfer in from:        
Steam 42xx 2-8-0T 4w/e 01/12/1945 4251 Transfer in from:        
Steam 42xx 2-8-0T 4w/e 01/12/1945 4273 Transfer in from:        
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 01/12/1945 4674 Transfer in from:        
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 01/12/1945 4685 Transfer in from:        
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 01/12/1945 4686 Transfer in from:        
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 01/12/1945 7703 Transfer in from:        
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 01/12/1945 8723 Transfer in from:        
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 29/12/1945 3729 Transfer in from:        
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 29/12/1945 3726 Transfer out to: NPT Ebbw Junction (Newport)    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 26/01/1946 8777 Transfer in from:        
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 8w/e 23/03/1946 3674 Transfer in from:        
Steam 45xx 2-6-2T 8w/e 23/03/1946 4522 Transfer in from:        
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 8w/e 23/03/1946 4682 Transfer in from:        
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 8w/e 23/03/1946 5756 Transfer in from:        
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 8w/e 23/03/1946 5789 Transfer in from:        
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 8w/e 23/03/1946 8724 Transfer in from:        
Steam 5205 2-8-0T 4w/e 20/04/1946 5236 Transfer in from:        
Steam 64xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 20/04/1946 6410 Transfer in from:        
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 20/04/1946 8794 Transfer in from:        
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 20/04/1946 3716 Transfer out to: CDF Cardiff Canton    
Steam 42xx 2-8-0T 4w/e 18/05/1946 4225 Transfer in from: NPT Ebbw Junction (Newport)    
Steam 64xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 18/05/1946 6410 Transfer out to: ABDR Aberdare    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 07/09/1946 3670 Transfer in from:        
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 07/09/1946 7740 Transfer in from:        
Steam 45xx 2-6-2T 4w/e 01/11/1947 4514 Transfer in from:        
Steam 45xx 2-6-2T 4w/e 01/11/1947 4541 Transfer out to: PPRD Pontypool Road    
Steam 42xx 2-8-0T 4w/e 21/02/1948 4214 Transfer in from:        
Steam 42xx 2-8-0T 4w/e 21/02/1948 4270 Transfer in from: 76 Ebbw Junction (Newport)    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 21/02/1948 4637 Transfer in from:        
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 21/02/1948 3729 Transfer out to: CDF Cardiff Canton    
Steam 5205 2-8-0T m/e 31/03/1948 5236 Transfer in from: ABEEG Aberbeeg    
Steam 42xx 2-8-0T m/e 31/03/1948 4222 Transfer out to: CDF Cardiff Canton    
Steam 5205 2-8-0T m/e 31/03/1948 5236 Transfer out to: ABEEG Aberbeeg    
Steam 4575 2-6-2T m/e 30/04/1948 5520 Transfer in from:        
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT m/e 31/05/1948 4652 Transfer in from:        
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT m/e 31/05/1948 4686 Transfer out to: CDF Cardiff Canton    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 10/07/1948 3711 Transfer in from:        
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 10/07/1948 3729 Transfer in from: CDF Cardiff Canton    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 10/07/1948 7740 Transfer out to: PPRD Pontypool Road    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 10/07/1948 8723 Transfer out to: CDF Cardiff Canton    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 07/08/1948 4686 Transfer in from: CDF Cardiff Canton    
Steam 5205 2-8-0T 4w/e 07/08/1948 5238 Transfer in from:        
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 07/08/1948 7775 Transfer in from:        
Steam 42xx 2-8-0T 4w/e 05/11/1949 4223 Transfer in from: CDF Cardiff Canton    
Steam 5205 2-8-0T 4w/e 31/12/1949 5207 Transfer in from: CDF Cardiff Canton    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 20/05/1950 6685 Transfer in from:        
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 20/05/1950 7721 Transfer in from:        
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 30/09/1950 6642 Transfer in from:        
Steam 42xx 2-8-0T 4w/e 30/11/1950 4271 Transfer in from: NPT Ebbw Junction (Newport)    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 28/02/1951 3691 Transfer in from:        
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 28/02/1951 3776 Transfer out to: 86D Llantrisant    
Steam 42xx 2-8-0T 4w/e 31/03/1951 4287 Transfer in from:        
Steam 42xx 2-8-0T 4w/e 31/03/1951 4223 Transfer out to: 86C Cardiff Canton    
Steam 42xx 2-8-0T m/e 31/07/1951 4222 Transfer in from: CDF Cardiff Canton    
Steam 42xx 2-8-0T m/e 31/07/1951 4227 Transfer in from:        
Steam 45xx 2-6-2T 4w/e 30/09/1951 4533 Transfer in from:        
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 30/09/1951 6654 Transfer out to: 86J Aberdare    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 30/09/1951 7721 Transfer out to: 86B Newport Pill    
Steam 4575 2-6-2T 4w/e 31/01/1952 4593 Transfer in from:        
Steam 45xx 2-6-2T 4w/e 31/01/1952 4533 Transfer out to: 86G Pontypool Road    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 31/03/1952 9459 Transfer in from: 86C Cardiff Canton    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 30/04/1952 9460 Transfer in from: 86C Cardiff Canton    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 3w/e 17/05/1952 5602 Transfer in from:        
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 3w/e 17/05/1952 6692 Transfer in from:        
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 3w/e 17/05/1952 6685 Transfer out to: 86J Aberdare    
Steam 42xx 2-8-0T 6w/e 30/06/1952 4222 Transfer out to: 86F Tondu    
Steam 45xx 2-6-2T 6w/e 30/06/1952 4522 Transfer out to: 86G Pontypool Road    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 6w/e 30/06/1952 5756 Transfer out to: 86G Pontypool Road    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 6w/e 30/06/1952 6692 Transfer out to: 86J Aberdare    
Steam 4575 2-6-2T 7w/e 31/08/1952 5532 Transfer in from:        
Steam 42xx 2-8-0T 4w/e 27/12/1952 4215 Transfer in from: 86F Tondu    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 27/12/1952 8786 Transfer in from: 86G Pontypool Road    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 24/01/1953 6638 Transfer in from: 86F Tondu    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 24/01/1953 8493 Transfer in from: 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport)    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 24/01/1953 8794 Transfer out to: 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport)    
Steam 45xx 2-6-2T m/e 02/1953 4514 Condemned      
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 21/02/1953 6672 Transfer in from:        
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 21/02/1953 8494 Transfer in from: 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport)    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 21/02/1953 3691 Transfer out to: 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport)    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 21/02/1953 6642 Transfer out to: 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport)    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 21/03/1953 6620 Transfer in from:        
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 18/04/1953 4643 Transfer in from: TDU Tondu    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 18/04/1953 5785 Transfer in from:        
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 18/04/1953 5789 Transfer out to: 86F Tondu    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 18/04/1953 6620 Transfer out to: 88C Barry    
Steam 42xx 2-8-0T 4w/e 16/05/1953 4271 Transfer out to: 86G Pontypool Road    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 31/05/1953 8436 1st Allocation        
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 8w/e 11/07/1953 8436 Transfer out to: 85B Gloucester Horton Road    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 08/08/1953 5645 Transfer in from:        
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 08/08/1953 8436 Transfer in from: 85B Gloucester Horton Road    
Steam 42xx 2-8-0T 4w/e 05/09/1953 4225 Transfer out to: 86C Cardiff Canton    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 05/09/1953 6672 Transfer out to: 86E Severn Tunnel Junction    
Steam 4575 2-6-2T 4w/e 03/10/1953 5573 Transfer in from: WOS Worcester    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 03/10/1953 8777 Transfer out to: 86G Pontypool Road    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 31/10/1953 3747 Transfer in from:        
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 31/10/1953 8724 Transfer out to: 86J Aberdare    
Steam 5205 2-8-0T 4w/e 25/11/1953 5236 Transfer out to: 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport)    
Steam 5205 2-8-0T 4w/e 26/12/1953 5241 Transfer in from: LTS Llantrisant    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 26/12/1953 9427 Transfer in from: 84F Stourbridge Junction    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 26/12/1953 9450 Transfer in from: 84F Stourbridge Junction    
Steam 5205 2-8-0T 4w/e 26/12/1953 5207 Transfer out to: 86C Cardiff Canton    
Steam 4575 2-6-2T 4w/e 26/12/1953 5532 Transfer out to: 82A Bristol Bath Road    
Steam 4575 2-6-2T 4w/e 26/12/1953 5573 Transfer out to: 86G Pontypool Road    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 30/01/1954 6638 Transfer out to: 85C Hereford    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 27/03/1954 6621 Transfer in from: 86F Tondu    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 27/03/1954 8439 Transfer in from: 86C Cardiff Canton    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 27/03/1954 5602 Transfer out to: 86C Cardiff Canton    
Steam 42xx 2-8-0T 4w/e 24/04/1954 4269 Transfer in from:        
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 24/04/1954 7774 Transfer in from:        
Steam 42xx 2-8-0T 4w/e 24/04/1954 4214 Transfer out to: 86B Newport Pill    
Steam 45xx 2-6-2T 4w/e 19/06/1954 4522 Transfer in from: 86G Pontypool Road    
Steam 42xx 2-8-0T 4w/e 17/07/1954 4250 Transfer in from: 86C Cardiff Canton    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 17/07/1954 4686 Transfer out to: 88B Cardiff East Dock    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 17/07/1954 9459 Transfer out to: 86C Cardiff Canton    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 09/10/1954 8494 Transfer out to: 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport)    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 06/11/1954 8494 Transfer in from: 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport)    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 04/12/1954 3729 Transfer out to: 84F Stourbridge Junction    
Steam 45xx 2-6-2T m/e 02/1955 4522 Condemned      
Steam 4575 2-6-2T 8w/e 26/03/1955 5544 Transfer in from: NA Newton Abbot    
Steam 42xx 2-8-0T 4w/e 23/04/1955 4277 Transfer in from: 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport)    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 23/04/1955 5685 Transfer in from:        
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 10/09/1955 6663 Transfer in from: 86C Cardiff Canton    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 10/09/1955 6621 Transfer out to: 86C Cardiff Canton    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 10/09/1955 8493 Transfer out to: 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport)    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 08/10/1955 5729 Transfer in from:        
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 08/10/1955 5794 Transfer in from: 86C Cardiff Canton    
Steam 4575 2-6-2T 4w/e 08/10/1955 5520 Transfer out to: 87H Neyland    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 05/11/1955 7775 Transfer out to: 86C Cardiff Canton    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 31/12/1955 3674 Transfer in from: ABEEG Aberbeeg    
Steam 5205 2-8-0T 4w/e 31/12/1955 5206 Transfer in from:        
Steam 4575 2-6-2T 4w/e 31/12/1955 5574 Transfer in from: 86F Tondu    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 31/12/1955 3674 Transfer out to: 86H Aberbeeg    
Steam 42xx 2-8-0T 4w/e 25/02/1956 4200 Transfer in from: STJ Severn Tunnel Junction    
Steam 42xx 2-8-0T 4w/e 25/02/1956 4259 Transfer in from: 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport)    
Steam 42xx 2-8-0T 4w/e 25/02/1956 4227 Transfer out to: 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport)    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 24/03/1956 3647 Transfer in from: 86J Aberdare    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 24/03/1956 8705 Transfer in from:        
Steam 42xx 2-8-0T 4w/e 24/03/1956 4215 Transfer out to: 86E Severn Tunnel Junction    
Steam 4575 2-6-2T m/e 16/06/1956 5564 Transfer in from: 82C Swindon    
Steam 4575 2-6-2T m/e 16/06/1956 5574 Transfer out to: 88A Cardiff Cathays    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 06/10/1956 9458 Transfer in from: 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport)    
Steam 4575 2-6-2T 4w/e 03/11/1956 5539 Transfer in from: 86G Pontypool Road    
Steam 4575 2-6-2T 4w/e 03/11/1956 4593 Transfer out to: 86G Pontypool Road    
Steam 5101 2-6-2T 8w/e 20/04/1957 4138 Transfer in from:        
Steam 42xx 2-8-0T 8w/e 20/04/1957 4237 Transfer in from:        
Steam 42xx 2-8-0T 8w/e 20/04/1957 4276 Transfer in from:        
Steam 4575 2-6-2T 8w/e 20/04/1957 5516 Transfer in from:        
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 8w/e 20/04/1957 6621 Transfer in from: 86C Cardiff Canton    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 8w/e 20/04/1957 8796 Transfer in from: PILL Newport Pill    
Steam 42xx 2-8-0T 8w/e 20/04/1957 4259 Transfer out to: 86B Newport Pill    
Steam 42xx 2-8-0T 8w/e 20/04/1957 4269 Transfer out to: 86F Tondu    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 8w/e 20/04/1957 4643 Transfer out to: 86B Newport Pill    
Steam 4575 2-6-2T 8w/e 20/04/1957 5564 Transfer out to: 86G Pontypool Road    
Steam 5101 2-6-2T 4w/e 18/05/1957 4138 Transfer out to: 86G Pontypool Road    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 18/05/1957 8439 Transfer out to: 86C Cardiff Canton    
Steam 42xx 2-8-0T 4w/e 13/07/1957 4273 Transfer out to: 87B Duffryn Yard    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT m/e 10/1957 5729 Condemned      
Steam 42xx 2-8-0T 4w/e 02/11/1957 4258 Transfer in from:        
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 02/11/1957 5657 Transfer in from: 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport)    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 02/11/1957 5790 Transfer in from:        
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 30/11/1957 3700 Transfer in from: 86B Newport Pill    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 30/11/1957 5759 Transfer in from: 86G Pontypool Road    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 30/11/1957 9459 Transfer in from: 86C Cardiff Canton    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 30/11/1957 3674 Transfer out to: 86B Newport Pill    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 30/11/1957 5657 Transfer out to: 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport)    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 30/11/1957 8786 Transfer out to: 86G Pontypool Road    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 30/11/1957 9450 Transfer out to: 86C Cardiff Canton    
Steam 42xx 2-8-0T 4w/e 25/01/1958 4285 Transfer in from: 86B Newport Pill    
Steam 42xx 2-8-0T 4w/e 25/01/1958 4291 Transfer in from:        
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 25/01/1958 8484 Transfer in from: 88A Cardiff Cathays    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 25/01/1958 8489 Transfer in from: 88A Cardiff Cathays    
Steam 42xx 2-8-0T 4w/e 25/01/1958 4258 Transfer out to: 86B Newport Pill    
Steam 42xx 2-8-0T 4w/e 25/01/1958 4276 Transfer out to: 86B Newport Pill    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 25/01/1958 4682 Transfer out to: 86B Newport Pill    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 25/01/1958 5645 Transfer out to: 86G Pontypool Road    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 25/01/1958 5790 Transfer out to: 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport)    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 25/01/1958 7703 Transfer out to: 86B Newport Pill    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 25/01/1958 8796 Transfer out to: 85A Worcester    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 22/02/1958 8429 Transfer in from: 86C Cardiff Canton    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 22/02/1958 3700 Transfer out to: 86K Tredegar    
Steam 4575 2-6-2T 4w/e 22/02/1958 5539 Transfer out to: 83E St Blazey    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 22/02/1958 7774 Transfer out to: 86K Tredegar    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 22/02/1958 8484 Transfer out to: 86C Cardiff Canton    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 22/03/1958 6644 Transfer in from: 86C Cardiff Canton    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 22/03/1958 6653 Transfer in from: 86G Pontypool Road    
Steam 42xx 2-8-0T 4w/e 22/03/1958 4200 Transfer out to: 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport)    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 22/03/1958 5685 Transfer out to: 86C Cardiff Canton    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 22/03/1958 5759 Transfer out to: 86G Pontypool Road    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 19/04/1958 8786 Transfer in from: 86G Pontypool Road    
Steam 4575 2-6-2T 4w/e 12/06/1958 5568 Transfer in from: 88A Cardiff Cathays    
Steam 4575 2-6-2T 4w/e 14/06/1958 5568 Transfer out to: 88C Barry    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 04/10/1958 6629 Transfer in from:        
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT m/e 12/1958 5785 Condemned      
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 24/01/1959 4627 Transfer in from: 85B Gloucester Horton Road    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 24/01/1959 3711 Transfer out to: 82C Swindon    
Steam 5205 2-8-0T 4w/e 24/01/1959 5241 Transfer out to: 87F Llanelly    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 21/02/1959 8437 Transfer in from: 88C Barry    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT m/e 06/1959 9427 Condemned      
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT m/e 09/1959 9459 Condemned      
Steam 5205 2-8-0T 4w/e 03/10/1959 5257 Transfer in from: 86B Newport Pill    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 03/10/1959 6653 Transfer out to: 87F Llanelly    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 03/10/1959 8494 Transfer out to: 81F Oxford    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 31/10/1959 7755 Transfer in from: 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport)    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 31/10/1959 3747 Transfer out to: 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport)    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT m/e 12/1959 5794 Condemned      
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 26/12/1959 8444 Transfer in from: 86J Aberdare    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT m/e 01/1960 8429 Condemned      
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 30/01/1960 5731 Transfer in from: 87C Danygraig    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 26/03/1960 5706 Transfer in from: 86F Tondu    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT m/e 05/1960 5731 Condemned      
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 18/06/1960 3676 Transfer in from: 84J Croes Newydd    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 16/07/1960 9682 Transfer in from:        
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 13/08/1960 3712 Transfer in from: 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport)    
Steam 5205 2-8-0T 4w/e 13/08/1960 5264 Transfer in from: 87B Duffryn Yard    
Steam 4575 2-6-2T 4w/e 13/08/1960 5544 Transfer out to: 83F Truro    
Steam 64xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 10/09/1960 6408 Transfer in from: 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport)    
Steam 64xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 10/09/1960 6419 Transfer in from: 85B Gloucester Horton Road    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 08/10/1960 7787 Transfer in from: 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport)    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 05/11/1960 3664 Transfer in from: 84A Stafford Road    
Steam 4575 2-6-2T 4w/e 05/11/1960 5516 Transfer out to: 83B Taunton    
Steam 42xx 2-8-0T m/e 01/1961 4287 Condemned      
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT m/e 01/1961 9458 Condemned      
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 25/02/1961 4652 Transfer out to: 86B Newport Pill    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 25/03/1961 4652 Transfer in from: 86B Newport Pill    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT m/e 04/1961 8705 Condemned      
Steam 42xx 2-8-0T 4w/e 22/04/1961 4246 Transfer in from: 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport)    
Steam 42xx 2-8-0T 4w/e 22/04/1961 4247 Transfer in from: 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport)    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 22/04/1961 8440 Transfer in from: 86B Newport Pill    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 22/04/1961 8499 Transfer in from: 86B Newport Pill    
Steam 42xx 2-8-0T 4w/e 22/04/1961 4250 Transfer out to: 87B Duffryn Yard    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 22/04/1961 6663 Transfer out to: 84F Stourbridge Junction    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT m/e 05/1961 3670 Condemned      
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT m/e 05/1961 3676 Condemned      
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 20/05/1961 6629 Transfer out to: 88D Merthyr Tydfil    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 20/05/1961 6644 Transfer out to: 84F Stourbridge Junction    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT m/e 06/1961 7787 Condemned      
Steam 5205 2-8-0T 4w/e 17/06/1961 5257 Transfer out to: 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport)    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 15/07/1961 4650 Transfer in from: 87D Swansea East Dock    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT m/e 09/1961 5706 Condemned      
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 09/09/1961 9444 Transfer in from: 87B Duffryn Yard    
Steam 5205 2-8-0T 4w/e 07/10/1961 5218 Transfer in from: 86C Cardiff Canton    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 07/10/1961 9494 Transfer in from: 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport)    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 04/11/1961 8489 Transfer out to: 85B Gloucester Horton Road    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 27/01/1962 3686 Transfer in from:        
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 27/01/1962 4693 Transfer in from: 84G Shrewsbury    
Steam 64xx 0-6-0PT m/e 02/1962 6408 Condemned      
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT m/e 02/1962 9460 Condemned      
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT m/e 05/1962 4685 Condemned      
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT m/e 05/1962 7755 Condemned      
Steam 42xx 2-8-0T 4w/e 19/05/1962 5202 Transfer in from: 86B Newport Pill    
Steam 5205 2-8-0T 4w/e 19/05/1962 5231 Transfer in from: LTS Llantrisant    
Steam 5205 2-8-0T 4w/e 19/05/1962 5252 Transfer in from: PILL Newport Pill    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 19/05/1962 3712 Transfer out to: 87H Neyland    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 19/05/1962 8436 Transfer out to: 81A Old Oak Common    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT m/e 06/1962 8499 Condemned      
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT m/e 07/1962 8440 Condemned      
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 14/07/1962 9482 Transfer in from: 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport)    
Steam 42xx 2-8-0T 4w/e 14/07/1962 4247 Transfer out to: 88H Tondu    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 11/08/1962 4604 Transfer in from: TN Taunton    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 11/08/1962 4637 Transfer out to: 88B Radyr    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 11/08/1962 6621 Transfer out to: 88B Radyr    
Steam 42xx 2-8-0T m/e 09/1962 4270 Condemned      
Steam 42xx 2-8-0T m/e 09/1962 4291 Condemned      
Steam 42xx 2-8-0T 13/11/1962 4246 Condemned      
Steam 5205 2-8-0T 2w/e 17/11/1962 5260 Transfer in from: 87F Llanelly    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 15/12/1962 4627 Transfer out to: 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport)    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 15/12/1962 4652 Transfer out to: 88H Tondu    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 12/01/1963 4693 Transfer out to: 87A Neath (Court Sart)    
Steam 72xx 2-8-2T 4w/e 09/02/1963 7212 Transfer in from: 86E Severn Tunnel Junction    
Steam 72xx 2-8-2T 4w/e 09/02/1963 7245 Transfer in from:        
Steam 5205 2-8-0T m/e 03/1963 5260 Condemned      
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT m/e 03/1963 9444 Condemned      
Steam 5205 2-8-0T 4w/e 06/04/1963 5214 Transfer in from: NPT Ebbw Junction (Newport)    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 06/04/1963 8493 Transfer in from: 86G Pontypool Road    
Steam 5205 2-8-0T 4w/e 04/05/1963 5238 Transfer out to: 87A Neath (Court Sart)    
Steam 42xx 2-8-0T m/e 06/1963 4251 Condemned      
Steam 42xx 2-8-0T 4w/e 29/06/1963 4277 Transfer out to: 86E Severn Tunnel Junction    
Steam 5205 2-8-0T 4w/e 29/06/1963 5264 Transfer out to: 86E Severn Tunnel Junction    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT m/e 07/1963 8444 Condemned      
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT m/e 07/1963 8786 Condemned      
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 27/07/1963 3766 Transfer in from: 87A Neath (Court Sart)    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 27/07/1963 9446 Transfer in from: 87A Neath (Court Sart)    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT m/e 08/1963 3766 Condemned      
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 5w/e 31/08/1963 9425 Transfer in from: 88C Barry    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT m/e 11/1963 9425 Condemned      
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT m/e 11/1963 9482 Condemned      
Steam 42xx 2-8-0T 4w/e 02/11/1963 4237 Transfer out to: 88J Aberdare    
Steam 42xx 2-8-0T 4w/e 02/11/1963 4285 Transfer out to: 88G Llantrisant    
Steam 42xx 2-8-0T 4w/e 02/11/1963 5202 Transfer out to: 82B St Philips Marsh    
Steam 5205 2-8-0T 4w/e 02/11/1963 5206 Transfer out to: 82B St Philips Marsh    
Steam 5205 2-8-0T 4w/e 02/11/1963 5214 Transfer out to: 86B Ebbw Junction (Newport)    
Steam 5205 2-8-0T 4w/e 02/11/1963 5231 Transfer out to: 88A Cardiff East Dock    
Steam 5205 2-8-0T 4w/e 02/11/1963 5252 Transfer out to: 88J Aberdare    
Steam 72xx 2-8-2T 4w/e 02/11/1963 7212 Transfer out to: 88J Aberdare    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 28/12/1963 3647 Transfer out to: 87B Duffryn Yard    
Steam 5205 2-8-0T 4w/e 25/01/1964 5214 Transfer in from: 86E Severn Tunnel Junction    
Steam 72xx 2-8-2T 4w/e 22/02/1964 7245 Transfer out to: 88B Radyr    
Steam 42xx 2-8-0T 6w/e 13/04/1964 4277 Transfer in from: 86E Severn Tunnel Junction    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT m/e 05/1964 3664 Condemned      
Steam 64xx 0-6-0PT 3w/e 04/05/1964 6419 Transfer out to: 83E Yeovil Town    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 3w/e 04/05/1964 9446 Transfer out to: 87D Swansea East Dock    
Steam 42xx 2-8-0T m/e 06/1964 4277 Condemned      
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 7w/e 22/06/1964 4663 Transfer in from: 87D Swansea East Dock    
Steam 72xx 2-8-2T 7w/e 22/06/1964 7217 Transfer in from: 87F Llanelly    
Steam 72xx 2-8-2T m/e 07/1964 7217 Condemned      
Steam 5205 2-8-0T m/e 09/1964 5214 Condemned      
Steam 5205 2-8-0T m/e 09/1964 5218 Condemned      
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 6w/e 12/10/1964 4604 Transfer out to: 87F Llanelly    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 6w/e 12/10/1964 4674 Transfer out to: 88B Radyr    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT m/e 11/1964 8437 Condemned      
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT m/e 11/1964 8493 Condemned      
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT m/e 11/1964 9494 Condemned      
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT w/e 08/11/1964 4650 Transfer out to: 88B Radyr    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT w/e 08/11/1964 9682 Transfer out to: 88B Radyr    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 2w/e 07/03/1965 3686 Transfer out to: 86E Severn Tunnel Junction    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT m/e 06/1965 4663 Condemned