Depot: Bury
Type | Class | Wheels | Period | Date | Number | Event | Code | Depot | Length of Stay | Notes |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/11/1935 | 12326 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Prince of Wales | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/11/1935 | 25839 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Prince of Wales | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | 25839 | Transfer in from: | 26D | Bury | ||
Steam | Prince of Wales | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | 25842 | Transfer in from: | 23D | Wigan Central (L&Y) | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | 12326 | Transfer out to: | 18A | Toton | ||
Steam | Prince of Wales | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | 25839 | Transfer out to: | 26D | Bury | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/04/1936 | 12149 | Transfer in from: | 19C | Canklow | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/04/1936 | 12164 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/04/1936 | 12170 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/04/1936 | 12207 | Transfer in from: | 18A | Toton | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/04/1936 | 12245 | Transfer in from: | 18A | Toton | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/04/1936 | 12247 | Transfer in from: | 18A | Toton | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/04/1936 | 12326 | Transfer in from: | 18A | Toton | ||
Steam | Prince of Wales | 4-6-0 | m/e | 06/1936 | 25842 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Prince of Wales | 4-6-0 | m/e | 01/1937 | 25839 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 10872 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | on | 01/01/1948 | 11338 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | on | 01/01/1948 | 11419 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | on | 01/01/1948 | 11481 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | on | 01/01/1948 | 11486 | Snapshot | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | on | 01/01/1948 | 11489 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | on | 01/01/1948 | 11504 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 12129 | Snapshot | 17B | Burton | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 12139 | Snapshot | 22B | Gloucester Barnwood | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 12159 | Snapshot | 23D | Wigan Central (L&Y) | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 12164 | Snapshot | 26D | Bury | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 12164 | Snapshot | 26D | Bury | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 12165 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 12207 | Snapshot | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 12245 | Snapshot | 26D | Bury | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 12245 | Snapshot | 26D | Bury | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 12246 | Snapshot | 26C | Bolton | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 12382 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 12455 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 898 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 12554 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 12579 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 12580 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 12581 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 12608 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 12615 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2473 | Snapshot | 10C | Patricroft | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2474 | Snapshot | 10C | Patricroft | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2476 | Snapshot | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2629 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 50823 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 50875 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 50892 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | on | 01/01/1948 | 51487 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 52170 | Snapshot | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 52326 | Snapshot | 26F | Lees (Oldham) | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8768 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8769 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9557 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9590 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9591 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9594 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9665 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9666 | Snapshot | 25A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9667 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 17/01/1948 | 10872 | Transfer out to: | 24F | Fleetwood | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 17/01/1948 | 50823 | Transfer out to: | 24F | Fleetwood | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 17/01/1948 | 50875 | Transfer out to: | 24F | Fleetwood | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 17/01/1948 | 50892 | Transfer out to: | 26C | Bolton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 20/03/1948 | 8768 | Transfer out to: | 25C | Goole | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 20/03/1948 | 8769 | Transfer out to: | 24B | Rose Grove | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 8036 | Transfer in from: | 16C | Kirkby in Ashfield | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 8120 | Transfer in from: | 18D | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | w/e | 07/08/1948 | 9514 | Transfer in from: | 25A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | w/e | 23/10/1948 | 51487 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 30/10/1948 | 12159 | Transfer out to: | 24D | Lower Darwen | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 30/10/1948 | 12579 | Transfer out to: | 24D | Lower Darwen | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 30/10/1948 | 12608 | Transfer out to: | 24D | Lower Darwen | ||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | w/e | 06/11/1948 | 11458 | Transfer in from: | 25C | Goole | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | w/e | 08/01/1949 | 9590 | Transfer out to: | 26F | Lees (Oldham) | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 12/02/1949 | 44544 | Transfer in from: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 25/06/1949 | 52137 | Transfer in from: | 26B | Agecroft | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 52137 | Transfer in from: | 26D | Bury | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 52137 | Transfer out to: | 26D | Bury | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 24/09/1949 | 52326 | Transfer in from: | 26E | Bacup | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 03/12/1949 | 90364 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 03/12/1949 | 90419 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | w/e | 17/12/1949 | 11338 | Transfer out to: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | w/e | 17/12/1949 | 11458 | Transfer out to: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 24/12/1949 | 90364 | Transfer in from: | 26D | Bury | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 24/12/1949 | 90419 | Transfer in from: | 26D | Bury | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 24/12/1949 | 8036 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 24/12/1949 | 90364 | Transfer out to: | 26D | Bury | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 24/12/1949 | 90419 | Transfer out to: | 26D | Bury | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | on | 31/12/1949 | 52326 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/01/1950 | 12159 | Transfer in from: | 24B | Rose Grove | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/01/1950 | 52334 | Transfer in from: | 24B | Rose Grove | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/01/1950 | 44544 | Transfer out to: | 24B | Rose Grove | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | w/e | 07/01/1950 | 49665 | Transfer out to: | 23B | Aintree | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 12159 | Transfer in from: | 26D | Bury | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 52334 | Transfer in from: | 26D | Bury | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 12159 | Transfer out to: | 26D | Bury | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 52334 | Transfer out to: | 26D | Bury | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 21/01/1950 | 8120 | Transfer out to: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 25/02/1950 | 52137 | Transfer out to: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 25/02/1950 | 52139 | Transfer out to: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/04/1950 | 52455 | Transfer out to: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | on | 04/08/1950 | 49514 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | w/e | 19/08/1950 | 51376 | Transfer in from: | 24F | Fleetwood | ||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | w/e | 19/08/1950 | 51481 | Transfer out to: | 28B | Fleetwood | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 49508 | Transfer in from: | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | ||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 51376 | Transfer in from: | 26D | Bury | ||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 51376 | Transfer out to: | 26D | Bury | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 52334 | Transfer out to: | 28A | Blackpool Central | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 21/10/1950 | 52271 | Transfer in from: | 27C | Southport | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 21/10/1950 | 52328 | Transfer in from: | 27E | Walton on the Hill | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 52271 | Transfer in from: | 26D | Bury | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 52328 | Transfer in from: | 26D | Bury | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 52271 | Transfer out to: | 26D | Bury | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 52328 | Transfer out to: | 26D | Bury | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 50647 | Transfer in from: | 26C | Bolton | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 50651 | Transfer in from: | 26E | Bacup | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 50656 | Transfer in from: | 26E | Bacup | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 50829 | Transfer in from: | 26C | Bolton | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 50647 | Transfer out to: | 24B | Rose Grove | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 26/05/1951 | 50647 | Transfer in from: | 24B | Rose Grove | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 26/05/1951 | 52615 | Transfer out to: | 27B | Aintree | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 09/06/1951 | 50655 | Transfer in from: | 23B | Aintree | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 09/06/1951 | 50829 | Transfer out to: | 27B | Aintree | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 50647 | Transfer in from: | 26D | Bury | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 50655 | Transfer in from: | 26D | Bury | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 50647 | Transfer out to: | 26D | Bury | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 50651 | Transfer out to: | 27B | Aintree | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 50655 | Transfer out to: | 26D | Bury | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 50651 | Transfer in from: | 27B | Aintree | ||
Steam | 898 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 52554 | Transfer out to: | 27D | Wigan Central (L&Y) | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | on | 29/09/1951 | 49594 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 03/11/1951 | 50731 | Transfer in from: | 26C | Bolton | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 4w/e | 01/12/1951 | 50650 | Transfer in from: | 26E | Bacup | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 4w/e | 01/12/1951 | 50656 | Transfer out to: | 26E | Bacup | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 90123 | Transfer in from: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 90194 | Transfer in from: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 90413 | Transfer in from: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 90555 | Transfer in from: | 24A | Accrington | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 90718 | Transfer in from: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 49557 | Transfer out to: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 49591 | Transfer out to: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 52268 | Transfer in from: | 26E | Bacup | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 50731 | Transfer out to: | 26C | Bolton | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 50647 | Transfer out to: | 26C | Bolton | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 52405 | Transfer in from: | 27A | Bank Hall | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 50650 | Transfer out to: | 26C | Bolton | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 50651 | Transfer out to: | 24B | Rose Grove | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 50655 | Transfer out to: | 24B | Rose Grove | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 52179 | Transfer in from: | 23B | Aintree | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 52427 | Transfer in from: | 26C | Bolton | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 90408 | Transfer in from: | 27B | Aintree | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 90626 | Transfer in from: | 24C | Lostock Hall | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 40586 | Transfer in from: | 24A | Accrington | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 40690 | Transfer in from: | 24A | Accrington | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 90359 | Transfer in from: | 26B | Agecroft | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 52165 | Transfer out to: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 52580 | Transfer out to: | 24B | Rose Grove | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 52328 | Transfer out to: | 26C | Bolton | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 3w/e | 24/01/1953 | 52159 | Transfer out to: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/03/1953 | 52246 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 90219 | Transfer in from: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 49508 | Transfer out to: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 18/04/1953 | 52581 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 02/05/1953 | 52382 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 52094 | Transfer in from: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 52239 | Transfer in from: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/08/1953 | 52237 | Transfer in from: | 25F | Low Moor | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 08/08/1953 | 90308 | Transfer in from: | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/08/1953 | 52427 | Transfer out to: | 25F | Low Moor | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 52207 | Transfer in from: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 52271 | Transfer out to: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | on | 07/10/1953 | 84016 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | on | 13/10/1953 | 84017 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | on | 23/10/1953 | 84018 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | on | 31/10/1953 | 84019 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 52207 | Transfer out to: | Crewe Works | |||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 28/11/1953 | 90226 | Transfer in from: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 28/11/1953 | 90568 | Transfer in from: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 28/11/1953 | 42473 | Transfer out to: | 24E | Blackpool Central | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 28/11/1953 | 42474 | Transfer out to: | 24E | Blackpool Central | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 28/11/1953 | 42476 | Transfer out to: | 24E | Blackpool Central | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 28/11/1953 | 42629 | Transfer out to: | 24E | Blackpool Central | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 28/11/1953 | 49666 | Transfer out to: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 28/11/1953 | 49667 | Transfer out to: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 30/01/1954 | 42651 | Transfer in from: | 26E | Bacup | ||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | w/e | 10/02/1954 | 51489 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 27/03/1954 | 90205 | Transfer in from: | 26C | Bolton | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 27/03/1954 | 90413 | Transfer out to: | 26B | Agecroft | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | on | 14/06/1954 | 80086 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 42473 | Transfer in from: | 24E | Blackpool Central | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 42474 | Transfer in from: | 24E | Blackpool Central | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 42476 | Transfer in from: | 24E | Blackpool Central | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 42625 | Transfer in from: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 84016 | Transfer out to: | 24F | Fleetwood | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 84017 | Transfer out to: | 24F | Fleetwood | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 84018 | Transfer out to: | 24F | Fleetwood | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 84019 | Transfer out to: | 24F | Fleetwood | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | on | 29/06/1954 | 80087 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | on | 14/07/1954 | 80088 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 42476 | Transfer out to: | 24C | Lostock Hall | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | on | 03/08/1954 | 80089 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | on | 12/08/1954 | 80090 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 14/08/1954 | 42473 | Transfer out to: | 27D | Wigan Central (L&Y) | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 11/09/1954 | 42474 | Transfer out to: | 24B | Rose Grove | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 42625 | Transfer out to: | 24E | Blackpool Central | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 42651 | Transfer out to: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 42619 | Transfer in from: | 26E | Bacup | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 42620 | Transfer in from: | 26E | Bacup | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 42649 | Transfer in from: | 26E | Bacup | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 42650 | Transfer in from: | 26E | Bacup | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 50647 | Transfer in from: | 26E | Bacup | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 50829 | Transfer in from: | 26E | Bacup | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 50887 | Transfer in from: | 26C | Bolton | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 52443 | Transfer in from: | 26E | Bacup | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 20/11/1954 | 52245 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 42719 | Transfer in from: | 25G | Farnley Junction | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 42731 | Transfer in from: | 25G | Farnley Junction | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 42820 | Transfer in from: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 42865 | Transfer in from: | 25G | Farnley Junction | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 90308 | Transfer out to: | 25G | Farnley Junction | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 01/01/1955 | 42110 | Transfer in from: | 25B | Huddersfield Hillhouse | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 01/01/1955 | 40586 | Transfer out to: | 26C | Bolton | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 01/01/1955 | 40690 | Transfer out to: | 25G | Farnley Junction | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 46406 | Transfer in from: | 23A | Bank Hall | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 46414 | Transfer in from: | 4B | Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 46416 | Transfer in from: | 23A | Bank Hall | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 46417 | Transfer in from: | 23A | Bank Hall | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 80046 | Transfer in from: | 15D | Bedford | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 80060 | Transfer in from: | 15D | Bedford | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 80061 | Transfer in from: | 15D | Bedford | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 80093 | Transfer in from: | 15D | Bedford | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 42110 | Transfer out to: | 24A | Accrington | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 42619 | Transfer out to: | 24A | Accrington | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 42620 | Transfer out to: | 24A | Accrington | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 42649 | Transfer out to: | 25F | Low Moor | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 42650 | Transfer out to: | 25F | Low Moor | ||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 51376 | Transfer out to: | 26C | Bolton | ||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 51419 | Transfer out to: | 24D | Lower Darwen | ||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 51486 | Transfer out to: | 26C | Bolton | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 4w/e | 26/02/1955 | 50647 | Transfer out to: | 26C | Bolton | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/03/1955 | 52179 | Transfer out to: | 24D | Lower Darwen | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/05/1955 | 52350 | Transfer in from: | 26C | Bolton | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/05/1955 | 52237 | Transfer out to: | 26C | Bolton | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 04/06/1955 | 52164 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 47584 | Transfer in from: | 26B | Agecroft | ||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 51504 | Transfer out to: | 26F | Belle Vue | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 18/02/1956 | 52239 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/02/1956 | 42700 | Transfer in from: | 25A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/02/1956 | 42712 | Transfer in from: | 25A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 25/02/1956 | 80046 | Transfer out to: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 25/02/1956 | 80060 | Transfer out to: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 25/02/1956 | 80061 | Transfer out to: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 25/02/1956 | 80093 | Transfer out to: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 46436 | Transfer in from: | 25C | Goole | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 42865 | Transfer out to: | 26B | Agecroft | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 80086 | Transfer out to: | 25A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 42444 | Transfer in from: | 6H | Bangor | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 42455 | Transfer in from: | 6H | Bangor | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 42460 | Transfer in from: | 7B | Bangor | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 42588 | Transfer in from: | 7B | Bangor | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 50829 | Transfer out to: | 26C | Bolton | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 50887 | Transfer out to: | 26C | Bolton | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 80087 | Transfer out to: | 6H | Bangor | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 80088 | Transfer out to: | 6H | Bangor | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 80089 | Transfer out to: | 6H | Bangor | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 80090 | Transfer out to: | 6H | Bangor | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 42652 | Transfer in from: | 26C | Bolton | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/12/1956 | 52405 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/12/1956 | 52289 | Transfer in from: | 27D | Wigan Central (L&Y) | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/12/1956 | 52387 | Transfer in from: | 27D | Wigan Central (L&Y) | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 23/03/1957 | 42565 | Transfer in from: | 26C | Bolton | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 20/04/1957 | 42565 | Transfer out to: | 26C | Bolton | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/04/1957 | 52350 | Transfer out to: | 26C | Bolton | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 18/05/1957 | 52094 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 42730 | Transfer in from: | 26B | Agecroft | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 90123 | Transfer out to: | 26B | Agecroft | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 90359 | Transfer out to: | 26B | Agecroft | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 10/05/1958 | 52387 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 27 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/05/1958 | 52527 | Transfer in from: | 24E | Blackpool Central | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 42652 | Transfer out to: | 26C | Bolton | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/08/1958 | 42932 | Transfer in from: | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 42286 | Transfer in from: | 27A | Bank Hall | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 42550 | Transfer in from: | 24J | Lancaster Green Ayre | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 42588 | Transfer out to: | 14D | Neasden | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 42932 | Transfer out to: | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 10/01/1959 | 42286 | Transfer out to: | 24C | Lostock Hall | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | on | 21/03/1959 | 52268 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 42455 | Transfer out to: | 24E | Blackpool Central | ||
Steam | 27 | 0-6-0 | on | 22/08/1959 | 52527 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 05/09/1959 | 52201 | Transfer in from: | 26F | Patricroft | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 05/09/1959 | 52207 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 10/10/1959 | 52289 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 17/10/1959 | 43880 | Transfer in from: | 24A | Accrington | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 43880 | Transfer in from: | 26D | Bury | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 43880 | Transfer out to: | 26D | Bury | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 14/11/1959 | 90226 | Transfer out to: | 26E | Lees (Oldham) | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 21/11/1959 | 52443 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 28/11/1959 | 90226 | Transfer in from: | 26E | Lees (Oldham) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 28/11/1959 | 90718 | Transfer out to: | 26E | Lees (Oldham) | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 23/01/1960 | 43913 | Transfer in from: | 20G | Hellifield | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 23/01/1960 | 52207 | Transfer out to: | 26E | Lees (Oldham) | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 42731 | Transfer out to: | 27D | Wigan Central (L&Y) | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 26/03/1960 | 44096 | Transfer in from: | 22C | Bath Green Park (S&D) | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 09/04/1960 | 47621 | Transfer in from: | 10C | Patricroft | ||
Steam | 27 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 09/04/1960 | 52526 | Transfer in from: | 24B | Rose Grove | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/11/1960 | 90219 | Transfer out to: | 27B | Aintree | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/11/1960 | 90626 | Transfer out to: | 26B | Agecroft | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 17/12/1960 | 90194 | Transfer out to: | 26E | Lees (Oldham) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 14/01/1961 | 90568 | Transfer out to: | 26F | Patricroft | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 04/02/1961 | 52201 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 27 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 25/03/1961 | 52526 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 44311 | Transfer in from: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 02/09/1961 | 52129 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 23/09/1961 | 90398 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 23/09/1961 | 90413 | Transfer in from: | 24C | Lostock Hall | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 12/05/1962 | 47621 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 11/08/1962 | 90398 | Transfer out to: | 24B | Rose Grove | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 44567 | Transfer in from: | 24G | Skipton | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 46405 | Transfer in from: | 27B | Aintree | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 46412 | Transfer in from: | 27B | Aintree | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 46439 | Transfer in from: | 27B | Aintree | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 42444 | Transfer out to: | 26C | Bolton | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 42460 | Transfer out to: | 26C | Bolton | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 42550 | Transfer out to: | 26C | Bolton | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 42730 | Transfer out to: | 27B | Aintree | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 90413 | Transfer out to: | 24F | Fleetwood | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 16/03/1963 | 90227 | Transfer in from: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 18/05/1963 | 90227 | Transfer out to: | 26C | Bolton | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 47602 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 90555 | Transfer out to: | 26B | Agecroft | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 19/10/1963 | 48164 | Transfer in from: | 26F | Patricroft | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 19/10/1963 | 48333 | Transfer in from: | 8E | Northwich | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 19/10/1963 | 48469 | Transfer in from: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 19/10/1963 | 48652 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 21/12/1963 | 90205 | Transfer out to: | 16E | Kirkby in Ashfield | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 21/12/1963 | 90364 | Transfer out to: | 9K | Bolton | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 21/12/1963 | 90408 | Transfer out to: | 16E | Kirkby in Ashfield | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 21/12/1963 | 90419 | Transfer out to: | 9K | Bolton | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 21/12/1963 | 90226 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 11/01/1964 | 46501 | Transfer in from: | 24C | Lostock Hall | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 25/01/1964 | 48224 | Transfer in from: | 10C | Fleetwood | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 25/01/1964 | 90205 | Transfer in from: | 16E | Kirkby in Ashfield | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | on | 01/02/1964 | 42719 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/02/1964 | 44096 | Transfer out to: | 9G | Gorton | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 29/02/1964 | 42831 | Transfer in from: | 9G | Gorton | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 29/02/1964 | 47584 | Transfer out to: | 9H | Patricroft | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 29/02/1964 | 47602 | Transfer out to: | 10C | Fleetwood | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 07/03/1964 | 90205 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 28/03/1964 | 90408 | Transfer in from: | 16E | Kirkby in Ashfield | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 28/03/1964 | 90408 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | on | 18/04/1964 | 42820 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 25/04/1964 | 44131 | Transfer in from: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 02/05/1964 | 42855 | Transfer in from: | 16A | Nottingham | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 02/05/1964 | 43880 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 09/05/1964 | 42905 | Transfer in from: | 26B | Agecroft | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | m/e | 06/1964 | 44567 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 44063 | Transfer in from: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | on | 12/09/1964 | 42855 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 19/09/1964 | 44779 | Transfer in from: | 24E | Blackpool Central | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 19/09/1964 | 45318 | Transfer in from: | 24E | Blackpool Central | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 19/09/1964 | 45377 | Transfer in from: | 24E | Blackpool Central | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 19/09/1964 | 45415 | Transfer in from: | 24E | Blackpool Central | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 10/10/1964 | 46504 | Transfer in from: | 12E | Barrow in Furness | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 10/10/1964 | 46506 | Transfer in from: | 12C | Barrow in Furness | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 10/10/1964 | 48106 | Transfer in from: | 9D | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 10/10/1964 | 48523 | Transfer in from: | 9D | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 10/10/1964 | 42831 | Transfer out to: | 9G | Gorton | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 10/10/1964 | 42905 | Transfer out to: | 9G | Gorton | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 17/10/1964 | 42712 | Transfer out to: | 9G | Gorton | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 24/10/1964 | 42700 | Transfer out to: | 9G | Gorton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 07/11/1964 | 48164 | Transfer out to: | 9J | Agecroft | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 07/11/1964 | 48224 | Transfer out to: | 9J | Agecroft | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 14/11/1964 | 45104 | Transfer in from: | 9D | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 14/11/1964 | 45381 | Transfer in from: | 9D | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 14/11/1964 | 44131 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 28/11/1964 | 44063 | Transfer out to: | 10G | Skipton | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 05/12/1964 | 45252 | Transfer in from: | 9D | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 12/12/1964 | 43913 | Transfer out to: | 10G | Skipton | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 20/03/1965 | 44779 | Transfer out to: | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 10/04/1965 | 44311 | Transfer out to: | 9K | Bolton | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/04/1965 | 45104 | Transfer out to: | 9K | Bolton | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/04/1965 | 45252 | Transfer out to: | 9K | Bolton | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/04/1965 | 45318 | Transfer out to: | 9K | Bolton | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/04/1965 | 45377 | Transfer out to: | 9K | Bolton | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/04/1965 | 45381 | Transfer out to: | 9K | Bolton | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/04/1965 | 45415 | Transfer out to: | 9K | Bolton | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 10/04/1965 | 46405 | Transfer out to: | 9K | Bolton | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 10/04/1965 | 46406 | Transfer out to: | 9D | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 10/04/1965 | 46412 | Transfer out to: | 9D | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 10/04/1965 | 46414 | Transfer out to: | 9K | Bolton | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 10/04/1965 | 46416 | Transfer out to: | 9K | Bolton | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 10/04/1965 | 46417 | Transfer out to: | 9K | Bolton | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 10/04/1965 | 46436 | Transfer out to: | 9K | Bolton | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 10/04/1965 | 46439 | Transfer out to: | 9K | Bolton | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 10/04/1965 | 46501 | Transfer out to: | 9D | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 10/04/1965 | 46504 | Transfer out to: | 9K | Bolton | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 10/04/1965 | 46506 | Transfer out to: | 9K | Bolton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 10/04/1965 | 48106 | Transfer out to: | 9K | Bolton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 10/04/1965 | 48333 | Transfer out to: | 9K | Bolton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 10/04/1965 | 48469 | Transfer out to: | 9K | Bolton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 10/04/1965 | 48523 | Transfer out to: | 9K | Bolton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 10/04/1965 | 48652 | Transfer out to: | 9K | Bolton |