Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 632 Today
» 1269 Yesterday
» 8971 Week
» 6079 Month
» 113025 Year
» 1334590 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Bushbury


Type Class Wheels Period Date Number Event Code Depot Length of Stay Notes
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 03/1930 1278 Snapshot 28 Holbeck (MR)    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 09/1933 1278 Snapshot W16 Longsight    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 27/03/1937 2961 Transfer in from: 3A Bescot    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 27/03/1937 2963 Transfer in from: 3A Bescot    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 27/03/1937 2969 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 27/03/1937 2981 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 02/07/1937 2981 Transfer out to: 3D Aston    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 03/07/1937 2961 Transfer out to: 3D Aston    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 02/10/1937 2970 Transfer in from: 9B Stockport Edgeley    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 24/09/1938 2963 Transfer out to: 4D Abergavenny    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 17/02/1940 2969 Transfer out to: BHD Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 17/02/1940 2970 Transfer out to: BHD Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam G2A 0-8-0 w/e 13/12/1947 9003 Transfer in from:        
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 w/e 20/12/1947 5531 Transfer in from:        
Steam G2A 0-8-0 w/e 20/12/1947 9003 Transfer out to: 3C Ryecroft (Walsall)    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 01/01/1948 4027 Snapshot        
Steam 4F 0-6-0 01/01/1948 4439 Snapshot        
Steam 4F 0-6-0 01/01/1948 4492 Snapshot        
Steam 18" Passenger Tank 0-6-2T 01/01/1948 46881 Snapshot        
Steam 18" Passenger Tank 0-6-2T 01/01/1948 46931 Snapshot        
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 01/01/1948 47 Snapshot        
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 01/01/1948 49 Snapshot        
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 01/01/1948 5287 Snapshot        
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 01/01/1948 53 Snapshot        
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 01/01/1948 54 Snapshot        
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 01/01/1948 5405 Snapshot        
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 01/01/1948 5434 Snapshot 3E Monument Lane    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 01/01/1948 5437 Snapshot        
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 01/01/1948 5514 Snapshot        
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 01/01/1948 5528 Snapshot        
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 01/01/1948 5529 Snapshot        
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 01/01/1948 5531 Snapshot 3B Bushbury    
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 01/01/1948 5531 Snapshot 3B Bushbury    
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 01/01/1948 5540 Snapshot        
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 01/01/1948 5733 Snapshot        
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 01/01/1948 5734 Snapshot        
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 01/01/1948 5738 Snapshot        
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 01/01/1948 5742 Snapshot        
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 01/01/1948 66 Snapshot        
Steam 1P 2-4-2T 01/01/1948 6654 Snapshot        
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 01/01/1948 7397 Snapshot        
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 01/01/1948 7398 Snapshot        
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 01/01/1948 7399 Snapshot        
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 01/01/1948 7413 Snapshot        
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 01/01/1948 7473 Snapshot        
Steam G2A 0-8-0 01/01/1948 9110 Snapshot        
Steam G2A 0-8-0 01/01/1948 9196 Snapshot        
Steam G1 0-8-0 01/01/1948 9204 Snapshot        
Steam G1 0-8-0 01/01/1948 9233 Snapshot        
Steam G1 0-8-0 01/01/1948 9295 Snapshot        
Steam G2A 0-8-0 01/01/1948 9356 Snapshot        
Steam G2A 0-8-0 w/e 24/01/1948 9240 Transfer in from: 9D Buxton (LNWR)    
Steam G1 0-8-0 w/e 14/02/1948 8939 Transfer in from: 8D Widnes    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 14/02/1948 7413 Transfer out to: 3C Ryecroft (Walsall)    
Steam G1 0-8-0 w/e 22/05/1948 9233 Condemned      
Steam G2A 0-8-0 w/e 05/06/1948 8940 Transfer in from: 5C Stafford    
Steam Coal Engines 0-6-0 w/e 19/06/1948 58349 Transfer in from:        
Steam 18" Passenger Tank 0-6-2T w/e 03/07/1948 46931 Transfer out to: 3E Monument Lane    
Steam 18" Passenger Tank 0-6-2T w/e 24/07/1948 46881 Condemned      
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 w/e 07/08/1948 45532 Transfer in from:        
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 w/e 07/08/1948 45514 Transfer out to: 7C Holyhead    
Steam G1 0-8-0 w/e 14/08/1948 9295 Condemned      
Steam G1 0-8-0 w/e 28/08/1948 9166 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 02/10/1948 45069 Transfer in from: 3C Ryecroft (Walsall)    
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 w/e 02/10/1948 45512 Transfer in from: 5A Crewe North    
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 w/e 02/10/1948 45514 Transfer in from: 7C Holyhead    
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 w/e 02/10/1948 45525 Transfer in from: 5A Crewe North    
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 w/e 02/10/1948 45529 Transfer in from: 3B Bushbury    
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 w/e 02/10/1948 45735 Transfer in from: 1B Camden    
Steam Coal Engines 0-6-0 w/e 02/10/1948 58348 Transfer in from:        
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 w/e 02/10/1948 45529 Transfer out to: 3B Bushbury    
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 w/e 02/10/1948 45734 Transfer out to: 5A Crewe North    
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 w/e 02/10/1948 5733 Transfer out to: 5A Crewe North    
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 w/e 02/10/1948 5738 Transfer out to: 5A Crewe North    
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 w/e 02/10/1948 5742 Transfer out to: 5A Crewe North    
Steam Coal Engines 0-6-0 w/e 02/10/1948 58349 Transfer out to: 3C Ryecroft (Walsall)    
Steam Coal Engines 0-6-0 w/e 09/10/1948 58348 Transfer out to: 3C Ryecroft (Walsall)    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T w/e 16/10/1948 41225 1st Allocation        
Steam 1142 0-6-0 w/e 23/10/1948 22911 Transfer in from:        
Steam 1142 0-6-0 w/e 23/10/1948 22971 Transfer in from:        
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 w/e 23/10/1948 5528 Transfer out to:        
Steam Cauliflowers 0-6-0 w/e 30/10/1948 28611 Transfer in from:        
Steam G1 0-8-0 m/e 11/1948 8939 Condemned      
Steam Cauliflowers 0-6-0 3w/e 11/12/1948 28619 Transfer in from:        
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 3w/e 11/12/1948 45545 Transfer in from: 8A Edge Hill    
Steam G2A 0-8-0 3w/e 11/12/1948 9167 Transfer in from: 2F Coventry    
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 3w/e 11/12/1948 45735 Transfer out to: 1B Camden    
Steam G2A 0-8-0 m/e 03/1949 49111 Condemned      
Steam G1 0-8-0 m/e 03/1949 49166 Condemned      
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5w/e 16/07/1949 45429 Transfer in from: 12A Carlisle Kingmoor    
Steam G1 0-8-0 5w/e 16/07/1949 48908 Transfer in from: 2C Northampton    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5w/e 16/07/1949 5493 Transfer in from: 5B Crewe South    
Steam G1 0-8-0 w/e 10/12/1949 49075 Transfer in from: 8B Warrington Dallam    
Steam G1 0-8-0 5w/e 24/12/1949 49075 Transfer in from: 3B Bushbury    
Steam G1 0-8-0 5w/e 24/12/1949 49075 Transfer out to: 3B Bushbury    
Steam G1 0-8-0 m/e 01/1950 49075 Condemned      
Steam Cauliflowers 0-6-0 3w/e 14/01/1950 58426 Transfer out to: 9B Stockport Edgeley    
Steam G2A 0-8-0 m/e 04/1950 49356 Condemned      
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 2w/e 17/06/1950 45703 Transfer in from: 9A Longsight    
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 2w/e 17/06/1950 45718 Transfer in from: 12B Carlisle Upperby    
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 2w/e 17/06/1950 45722 Transfer in from: 5A Crewe North    
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 2w/e 17/06/1950 45724 Transfer in from: 5A Crewe North    
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 2w/e 17/06/1950 45726 Transfer in from: 10C Patricroft    
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 2w/e 17/06/1950 45733 Transfer in from: 5A Crewe North    
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 2w/e 17/06/1950 45741 Transfer in from: 1B Camden    
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 2w/e 17/06/1950 45742 Transfer in from: 10B Preston    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 2w/e 17/06/1950 45069 Transfer out to: 3C Ryecroft (Walsall)    
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 2w/e 17/06/1950 45514 Transfer out to: 1B Camden    
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 2w/e 17/06/1950 45525 Transfer out to: 12A Carlisle Upperby    
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 2w/e 17/06/1950 45531 Transfer out to: 8A Edge Hill    
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 2w/e 17/06/1950 45540 Transfer out to: 9A Longsight    
Steam G1 0-8-0 m/e 09/1950 48908 Condemned      
Steam G1 0-8-0 4w/e 09/09/1950 49346 Transfer in from: 8A Edge Hill    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4w/e 07/10/1950 45015 Transfer in from: 3E Monument Lane    
Steam Royal Scot 4-6-0 4w/e 07/10/1950 46110 Transfer in from: 12B Carlisle Upperby    
Steam Royal Scot 4-6-0 4w/e 07/10/1950 46140 Transfer in from: 1B Camden    
Steam Royal Scot 4-6-0 4w/e 07/10/1950 46163 Transfer in from: 12A Carlisle Upperby    
Steam Royal Scot 4-6-0 4w/e 07/10/1950 46165 Transfer in from: 7C Holyhead    
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 4w/e 07/10/1950 45718 Transfer out to: 12A Carlisle Upperby    
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 4w/e 07/10/1950 45722 Transfer out to: 12A Carlisle Upperby    
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 4w/e 07/10/1950 45724 Transfer out to: 5A Crewe North    
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 4w/e 07/10/1950 45726 Transfer out to: 8A Edge Hill    
Steam Royal Scot 4-6-0 4w/e 04/11/1950 46148 Transfer in from: 5A Crewe North    
Steam Royal Scot 4-6-0 4w/e 04/11/1950 46151 Transfer in from: 1B Camden    
Steam 2F 0-6-0 4w/e 04/11/1950 58285 Transfer in from: 8E Brunswick    
Steam 2F 0-6-0 4w/e 04/11/1950 58286 Transfer in from: 8E Brunswick    
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 4w/e 04/11/1950 45733 Transfer out to: 5A Crewe North    
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 4w/e 04/11/1950 45742 Transfer out to: 9A Longsight    
Steam Royal Scot 4-6-0 4w/e 02/12/1950 46158 Transfer in from: 5A Crewe North    
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 4w/e 02/12/1950 45703 Transfer out to: 5A Crewe North    
Steam 2F 0-6-0 4w/e 02/12/1950 58286 Transfer out to: 3E Monument Lane    
Steam 1142 0-6-0 4w/e 31/12/1950 58183 Transfer in from:        
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 31/12/1950 40047 Transfer out to: 3C Ryecroft (Walsall)    
Steam Cauliflowers 0-6-0 4w/e 31/12/1950 58429 Transfer out to: 5B Crewe South    
Steam Royal Scot 4-6-0 4w/e 27/01/1951 46134 Transfer in from: 8A Edge Hill    
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 4w/e 27/01/1951 45741 Transfer out to: 8A Edge Hill    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4w/e 24/02/1951 45434 Transfer out to: 2A Rugby    
Steam Royal Scot 4-6-0 4w/e 24/02/1951 46165 Transfer out to: 5A Crewe North    
Steam G2A 0-8-0 4w/e 24/02/1951 49196 Transfer out to: 10B Preston    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4w/e 24/03/1951 44829 Transfer in from: 3E Monument Lane    
Steam Royal Scot 4-6-0 4w/e 24/03/1951 46165 Transfer in from: 5A Crewe North    
Steam G1 0-8-0 4w/e 24/03/1951 49346 Transfer out to: 3D Aston    
Steam G1 0-8-0 m/e 04/1951 49204 Condemned      
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 19/05/1951 44512 Transfer in from: 3C Ryecroft (Walsall)    
Steam G2A 0-8-0 4w/e 19/05/1951 49126 Transfer in from: 10A Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam G2A 0-8-0 4w/e 19/05/1951 49247 Transfer in from: 8B Warrington Dallam    
Steam 2F 0-6-0 m/e 06/1951 58285 Condemned      
Diesel 11 0-6-0 17/07/1951 12090 1st Allocation        
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 4w/e 17/07/1951 45688 Transfer in from: 5A Crewe North    
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 4w/e 17/07/1951 45703 Transfer in from: 1B Camden    
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 4w/e 17/07/1951 45733 Transfer in from: 5A Crewe North    
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 4w/e 17/07/1951 45734 Transfer in from: 5A Crewe North    
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 4w/e 17/07/1951 45737 Transfer in from: 5A Crewe North    
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 4w/e 17/07/1951 45738 Transfer in from: 5A Crewe North    
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 4w/e 17/07/1951 45741 Transfer in from: 8A Edge Hill    
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 4w/e 17/07/1951 45742 Transfer in from: 9A Longsight    
Steam Royal Scot 4-6-0 4w/e 17/07/1951 46110 Transfer out to: 12A Carlisle Upperby    
Steam Royal Scot 4-6-0 4w/e 17/07/1951 46134 Transfer out to: 5A Crewe North    
Steam Royal Scot 4-6-0 4w/e 17/07/1951 46140 Transfer out to: 5A Crewe North    
Steam Royal Scot 4-6-0 4w/e 17/07/1951 46148 Transfer out to: 5A Crewe North    
Steam Royal Scot 4-6-0 4w/e 17/07/1951 46151 Transfer out to: 8A Edge Hill    
Steam Royal Scot 4-6-0 4w/e 17/07/1951 46158 Transfer out to: 8A Edge Hill    
Steam Royal Scot 4-6-0 4w/e 17/07/1951 46163 Transfer out to: 12A Carlisle Upperby    
Steam Royal Scot 4-6-0 4w/e 17/07/1951 46165 Transfer out to: 8A Edge Hill    
Diesel 11 0-6-0 08/09/1951 12093 1st Allocation        
Diesel 11 0-6-0 06/10/1951 12094 1st Allocation        
Steam G1 0-8-0 4w/e 06/10/1951 49371 Transfer in from: 10C Patricroft    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 29/12/1951 44512 Transfer out to: 3E Monument Lane    
Steam G1 0-8-0 m/e 01/1952 49371 Condemned      
Steam 2F 0-6-0 4w/e 26/01/1952 58257 Transfer in from:        
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 4w/e 26/01/1952 47399 Transfer out to: 10C Patricroft    
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 4w/e 23/02/1952 45592 Transfer in from: 5A Crewe North    
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 4w/e 22/03/1952 45592 Transfer out to: 5A Crewe North    
Steam 1P 2-4-2T 4w/e 22/03/1952 46654 Transfer out to: 2C Warwick    
Steam 2F 0-6-0 4w/e 22/03/1952 58257 Transfer out to: 11B Barrow in Furness    
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 8w/e 14/06/1952 45738 Transfer in from: 3B Bushbury    
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 8w/e 14/06/1952 45738 Transfer out to: 3B Bushbury    
Steam G1 0-8-0 4w/e 12/07/1952 49107 Transfer in from:        
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4w/e 12/07/1952 45437 Transfer out to: 3A Bescot    
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 4w/e 12/07/1952 45529 Transfer out to: 1B Camden    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 09/08/1952 40122 Transfer in from: 6G Llandudno Junction    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 09/08/1952 40125 Transfer in from: 6G Llandudno Junction    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 09/08/1952 40207 Transfer in from: 7A Llandudno Junction    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 09/08/1952 40049 Transfer out to: 2B Nuneaton    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 09/08/1952 40053 Transfer out to: 2B Nuneaton    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 09/08/1952 40066 Transfer out to: 2B Nuneaton    
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 4w/e 04/10/1952 45586 Transfer in from: 8A Edge Hill    
Steam G2 0-8-0 4w/e 04/10/1952 49416 Transfer in from: 2B Bletchley    
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 8w/e 29/11/1952 45586 Transfer out to: 5A Crewe North    
Diesel 11 0-6-0 3w/e 24/01/1953 12093 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 4w/e 16/05/1953 47363 Transfer in from: 3D Aston    
Steam G1 0-8-0 4w/e 16/05/1953 49107 Transfer out to: 3A Bescot    
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 8w/e 11/07/1953 45647 Transfer in from: 8A Edge Hill    
Steam G2 0-8-0 4w/e 31/10/1953 49416 Transfer out to: 8D Widnes    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 30/01/1954 40064 Transfer in from: 20G Hellifield    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 30/01/1954 40084 Transfer in from: 3C Ryecroft (Walsall)    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4w/e 27/03/1954 45310 Transfer in from: 3E Monument Lane    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4w/e 27/03/1954 45439 Transfer in from: 12B Carlisle Upperby    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 8w/e 19/06/1954 40129 Transfer in from: 3E Monument Lane    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 8w/e 19/06/1954 40064 Transfer out to: 1A Willesden    
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 4w/e 17/07/1954 45726 Transfer in from: 5A Crewe North    
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 4w/e 17/07/1954 45740 Transfer in from: 1B Camden    
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 4w/e 17/07/1954 45703 Transfer out to: 1B Camden    
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 4w/e 14/08/1954 45555 Transfer in from: 5A Crewe North    
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 4w/e 11/09/1954 45726 Transfer out to: 5A Crewe North    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 04/12/1954 13090 1st Allocation        
Steam G2A 0-8-0 4w/e 01/01/1955 49126 Transfer out to: 3A Bescot    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 26/02/1955 40080 Transfer in from: 3C Ryecroft (Walsall)    
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 4w/e 26/02/1955 45586 Transfer in from: 5A Crewe North    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 23/04/1955 42428 Transfer in from: 11A Carnforth    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 23/04/1955 42429 Transfer in from: 11A Carnforth    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 23/04/1955 42601 Transfer in from: 11B Barrow in Furness    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 21/05/1955 42343 Transfer in from: 1C Watford    
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 4w/e 21/05/1955 45709 Transfer in from: 5A Crewe North    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 21/05/1955 40084 Transfer out to: 6K Rhyl    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 21/05/1955 40122 Transfer out to: 3C Ryecroft (Walsall)    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 21/05/1955 40129 Transfer out to: 3D Aston    
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 4w/e 13/08/1955 45586 Transfer out to: 5A Crewe North    
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 4w/e 05/11/1955 45625 Transfer in from: 5A Crewe North    
Steam 1142 0-6-0 30/11/1955 58152 Condemned      
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 4w/e 31/12/1955 45634 Transfer in from: 5A Crewe North    
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 4w/e 31/12/1955 45625 Transfer out to: 5A Crewe North    
Steam 2F 0-6-0 4w/e 28/01/1956 58204 Transfer in from:        
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 4w/e 25/02/1956 45552 Transfer in from: 9A Longsight    
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 4w/e 25/02/1956 45678 Transfer in from: 5A Crewe North    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4w/e 25/02/1956 45310 Transfer out to: 2A Rugby    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4w/e 25/02/1956 45429 Transfer out to: 1A Willesden    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4w/e 24/03/1956 45310 Transfer in from: 2A Rugby    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 24/03/1956 40080 Transfer out to: 3C Ryecroft (Walsall)    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 24/03/1956 40207 Transfer out to: 2B Nuneaton    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 24/03/1956 42343 Transfer out to: 12A Carlisle Upperby    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 24/03/1956 42601 Transfer out to: 3E Monument Lane    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 24/03/1956 44492 Transfer out to: 3D Aston    
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 4w/e 24/03/1956 45552 Transfer out to: 12A Carlisle Upperby    
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 4w/e 24/03/1956 45634 Transfer out to: 5A Crewe North    
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 4w/e 24/03/1956 45678 Transfer out to: 5A Crewe North    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4w/e 19/05/1956 45310 Transfer out to: 2A Rugby    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 m/e 16/06/1956 45310 Transfer in from: 2A Rugby    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T m/e 16/06/1956 40125 Transfer out to: 1A Willesden    
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 4w/e 06/10/1956 45545 Transfer out to: 5A Crewe North    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4w/e 03/11/1956 45403 Transfer in from: 3D Aston    
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 4w/e 01/12/1956 45740 Transfer out to: 1A Willesden    
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 4w/e 23/02/1957 45672 Transfer in from: 8A Edge Hill    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 23/03/1957 44488 Transfer in from: 3C Ryecroft (Walsall)    
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 4w/e 23/03/1957 45634 Transfer in from: 5A Crewe North    
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 4w/e 23/03/1957 45672 Transfer out to: 1B Camden    
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 4w/e 20/04/1957 45634 Transfer out to: 5A Crewe North    
Steam G2A 0-8-0 m/e 05/1957 48940 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 10/08/1957 42449 Transfer in from: 5D Stoke    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 10/08/1957 42566 Transfer in from: 5A Crewe North    
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 4w/e 10/08/1957 45625 Transfer in from: 5A Crewe North    
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 4w/e 10/08/1957 45666 Transfer in from: 12A Carlisle Upperby    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4w/e 10/08/1957 45403 Transfer out to: 9A Longsight    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 07/09/1957 42449 Transfer out to: 5D Stoke    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 07/09/1957 42566 Transfer out to: 5A Crewe North    
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 4w/e 07/09/1957 45625 Transfer out to: 5A Crewe North    
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 4w/e 07/09/1957 45666 Transfer out to: 12A Carlisle Upperby    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 8w/e 05/10/1957 41220 Transfer in from: 1C Watford    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 8w/e 05/10/1957 42658 Transfer in from: 3E Monument Lane    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 8w/e 05/10/1957 42674 Transfer in from: 5D Stoke    
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 8w/e 05/10/1957 45672 Transfer in from: 1B Camden    
Steam G2A 0-8-0 m/e 11/1957 49247 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 30/11/1957 42488 Transfer in from: 3C Ryecroft (Walsall)    
Steam G2A 0-8-0 4w/e 30/11/1957 48950 Transfer in from: 3A Bescot    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 30/11/1957 41220 Transfer out to: 1C Watford    
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 4w/e 30/11/1957 45672 Transfer out to: 1B Camden    
Steam G2A 0-8-0 28/12/1957 49167 Condemned      
Steam G2 0-8-0 4w/e 25/01/1958 49411 Transfer in from: 2D Coventry    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 15/02/1958 40054 Transfer out to: 62B Dundee Tay Bridge    
Steam G2 0-8-0 4w/e 22/02/1958 49452 Transfer in from: 2A Rugby    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 14/06/1958 41279 Transfer in from: 3C Ryecroft (Walsall)    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4w/e 14/06/1958 45395 Transfer in from: 3C Ryecroft (Walsall)    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 14/06/1958 42658 Transfer out to: 3D Aston    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 14/06/1958 42674 Transfer out to: 3E Monument Lane    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 14/06/1958 44488 Transfer out to: 3A Bescot    
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 4w/e 14/06/1958 45733 Transfer out to: 5A Crewe North    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 12/07/1958 42429 Transfer out to: 2A Rugby    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 09/08/1958 42429 Transfer in from: 2A Rugby    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 06/09/1958 42488 Transfer out to: 3E Monument Lane    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 04/10/1958 42560 Transfer in from: 3A Bescot    
Steam 1142 0-6-0 w/e 24/01/1959 58124 Transfer in from: 3D Aston    
Steam 2F 0-6-0 w/e 24/01/1959 58295 Transfer in from:        
Steam 1142 0-6-0 w/e 31/01/1959 58118 Transfer in from: 2D Nuneaton    
Steam 2F 0-6-0 w/e 31/01/1959 58281 Transfer in from: 2B Nuneaton    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 21/02/1959 42560 Transfer out to: 9G Gorton    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 14/03/1959 42429 Transfer out to: 9G Gorton    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 04/04/1959 42428 Transfer out to: 15C Leicester Midland    
Steam 2F 0-6-0 m/e 05/1959 58204 Condemned      
Steam 2F 0-6-0 m/e 05/1959 58281 Condemned      
Steam 1142 0-6-0 19/05/1959 58119 Condemned      
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 w/e 30/05/1959 45587 Transfer in from: 9A Longsight    
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 w/e 30/05/1959 45592 Transfer in from: 1B Camden    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 20/06/1959 45395 Transfer out to: 3D Aston    
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 w/e 01/08/1959 45587 Transfer out to: 9A Longsight    
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 w/e 01/08/1959 45592 Transfer out to: 1B Camden    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 03/10/1959 47399 Transfer in from: 10C Patricroft    
Steam G2 0-8-0 w/e 24/10/1959 49411 Transfer out to: 3A Bescot    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T w/e 31/10/1959 41225 Transfer out to: 14E Bedford    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 07/11/1959 42582 Transfer in from: 5D Stoke    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 07/11/1959 42659 Transfer in from: 5D Stoke    
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 w/e 07/11/1959 45540 Transfer in from: 9A Longsight    
Steam Royal Scot 4-6-0 w/e 07/11/1959 46122 Transfer in from: 12B Carlisle Upperby    
Steam Royal Scot 4-6-0 w/e 07/11/1959 46141 Transfer in from: 12A Carlisle Upperby    
Steam Royal Scot 4-6-0 w/e 07/11/1959 46143 Transfer in from: 9A Longsight    
Steam Royal Scot 4-6-0 w/e 07/11/1959 46153 Transfer in from: 9A Longsight    
Steam Royal Scot 4-6-0 w/e 07/11/1959 46158 Transfer in from: 9A Longsight    
Steam G2A 0-8-0 w/e 07/11/1959 49229 Transfer in from: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 07/11/1959 44027 Transfer out to: 3A Bescot    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 07/11/1959 44439 Transfer out to: 3D Aston    
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 w/e 07/11/1959 45555 Transfer out to: 12B Carlisle Upperby    
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 w/e 07/11/1959 45688 Transfer out to: 12B Carlisle Upperby    
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 w/e 07/11/1959 45734 Transfer out to: 12B Carlisle Upperby    
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 w/e 07/11/1959 45738 Transfer out to: 12B Carlisle Upperby    
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 w/e 07/11/1959 45741 Transfer out to: 12B Carlisle Upperby    
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 w/e 07/11/1959 45742 Transfer out to: 12B Carlisle Upperby    
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 w/e 28/11/1959 45532 Transfer out to: 16A Nottingham    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T m/e 12/1959 47363 Condemned      
Steam 1142 0-6-0 28/01/1960 58118 Condemned      
Steam 1142 0-6-0 28/01/1960 58183 Condemned      
Steam 1142 0-6-0 w/e 06/02/1960 58128 Transfer in from: 17B Burton    
Steam 1142 0-6-0 w/e 20/02/1960 58168 Transfer in from: 21A Saltley    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T w/e 20/02/1960 41279 Transfer out to: 15C Leicester Midland    
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 w/e 12/03/1960 45592 Transfer in from: 24L Carnforth    
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 w/e 21/05/1960 45592 Transfer out to: 24L Carnforth    
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 w/e 11/06/1960 45737 Transfer out to: 5A Crewe North    
Steam 1142 0-6-0 w/e 13/06/1960 58148 Transfer in from: 17B Burton    
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 w/e 13/06/1960 45647 Transfer out to: 3D Aston    
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 w/e 13/06/1960 45709 Transfer out to: 3D Aston    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 18/06/1960 45287 Transfer out to: 21B Bescot    
Steam 1142 0-6-0 14/07/1960 58168 Condemned      
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 17/09/1960 45071 Transfer in from: 3E Monument Lane    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 17/09/1960 45308 Transfer in from: 3E Monument Lane    
Diesel 11 0-6-0 w/e 05/11/1960 12087 Transfer in from: 68A Carlisle Kingmoor    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 05/11/1960 13088 Transfer in from: 12A Carlisle Upperby    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 05/11/1960 D3867 Transfer in from: 24J Lancaster Green Ayre    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 05/11/1960 D3871 Transfer in from: 24J Lancaster Green Ayre    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 05/11/1960 47397 Transfer out to: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 05/11/1960 47473 Transfer out to: 24L Carnforth    
Steam 2F 0-6-0 w/e 12/11/1960 58295 Condemned      
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 19/11/1960 47398 Transfer out to: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 19/11/1960 47399 Transfer out to: 5E Alsager    
Steam G2A 0-8-0 w/e 19/11/1960 49229 Condemned      
Steam Royal Scot 4-6-0 w/e 03/12/1960 46122 Transfer out to: 1A Willesden    
Steam Royal Scot 4-6-0 w/e 03/12/1960 46141 Transfer out to: 1A Willesden    
Steam Royal Scot 4-6-0 w/e 03/12/1960 46158 Transfer out to: 1A Willesden    
Steam Royal Scot 4-6-0 w/e 17/12/1960 46143 Transfer out to: 9E Trafford Park (LMS)    
Steam Royal Scot 4-6-0 w/e 07/01/1961 46153 Transfer out to: 9E Trafford Park (LMS)    
Steam G2A 0-8-0 w/e 14/01/1961 49070 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 w/e 14/01/1961 45540 Transfer out to: 9E Trafford Park (LMS)    
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 w/e 04/03/1961 45527 Transfer in from: 8A Edge Hill    
Steam Royal Scot 4-6-0 w/e 04/03/1961 46114 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Steam Royal Scot 4-6-0 w/e 04/03/1961 46161 Transfer in from: 24K Preston    
Steam Royal Scot 4-6-0 w/e 04/03/1961 46167 Transfer in from: 12B Carlisle Upperby    
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 w/e 06/05/1961 45527 Transfer out to: 6J Holyhead    
Steam Royal Scot 4-6-0 w/e 10/06/1961 46114 Transfer out to: 6G Llandudno Junction    
Steam Royal Scot 4-6-0 w/e 10/06/1961 46161 Transfer out to: 24K Preston    
Steam Royal Scot 4-6-0 w/e 10/06/1961 46167 Transfer out to: 24K Preston    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 17/06/1961 45071 Transfer out to: 21E Monument Lane    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 12/08/1961 D2395 1st Allocation        
Diesel 03 0-6-0 w/e 09/09/1961 D2395 Transfer in from: 2E Northampton    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 18/11/1961 45015 Transfer out to: 8A Edge Hill    
Steam G2A 0-8-0 w/e 30/12/1961 48950 Condemned      
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 13/01/1962 44837 Transfer in from: 21D Aston    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 13/01/1962 45332 Transfer in from: 21D Aston    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 24/03/1962 46428 Transfer in from: 21B Bescot    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 24/03/1962 46448 Transfer in from: 21B Bescot    
Steam G2A 0-8-0 w/e 24/03/1962 49099 Transfer in from: 3A Bescot    
Steam 1142 0-6-0 w/e 24/03/1962 58124 Transfer out to: 21B Bescot    
Steam 1142 0-6-0 w/e 24/03/1962 58128 Transfer out to: 18A Toton    
Steam 1142 0-6-0 w/e 24/03/1962 58148 Transfer out to: 15D Coalville    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 23/06/1962 45332 Transfer out to: 6A Chester (Midland)    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 30/06/1962 46421 Transfer in from: 3A Bescot    
Steam G2A 0-8-0 w/e 21/07/1962 49099 Condemned      
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 11/08/1962 42966 Transfer in from: 21B Bescot    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 11/08/1962 46421 Transfer out to: 21B Bescot    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 18/08/1962 42977 Transfer in from: 5B Crewe South    
Steam G2A 0-8-0 w/e 18/08/1962 48895 Transfer in from: 10A Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam G2A 0-8-0 w/e 15/09/1962 49240 Condemned      
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 13/10/1962 45439 Transfer out to: 21D Aston    
Steam G2A 0-8-0 w/e 10/11/1962 49361 Transfer in from: 3A Bescot    
Steam G2 0-8-0 w/e 10/11/1962 49407 Transfer in from: 2A Rugby    
Steam G2 0-8-0 w/e 17/11/1962 49452 Transfer out to: 21B Bescot    
Steam G2A 0-8-0 w/e 17/11/1962 49070 Condemned      
Steam G2 0-8-0 w/e 24/11/1962 49446 Transfer in from: 9D Buxton (LNWR)    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 15/12/1962 45439 Transfer in from: 21D Aston    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 15/12/1962 42977 Transfer out to: 5D Stoke    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 15/12/1962 44837 Transfer out to: 21D Aston    
Steam G2A 0-8-0 w/e 22/12/1962 49361 Transfer out to: 21B Bescot    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 09/03/1963 42965 Transfer in from: 5D Stoke    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 06/04/1963 42659 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 25/05/1963 42582 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 01/06/1963 42068 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 01/06/1963 42604 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 22/06/1963 44829 Transfer out to: 6J Holyhead    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 22/06/1963 45493 Transfer out to: 6J Holyhead    
Steam G2 0-8-0 w/e 20/07/1963 49407 Transfer out to: 21B Bescot    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 07/12/1963 46448 Transfer out to: 2E Saltley    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 14/12/1963 42068 Condemned      
Steam G2 0-8-0 09/04/1964 49446 Condemned      
Diesel D3/7 0-6-0 w/e 27/06/1964 12012 Transfer in from: 21B Bescot    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 07/1964 42957 Transfer in from: 21B Bescot    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 07/1964 42983 Transfer in from: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 25/07/1964 42966 Condemned      
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 08/08/1964 42965 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 19/09/1964 42062 Transfer in from: 2A Rugby    
Steam G2A 0-8-0 w/e 03/10/1964 48895 Transfer out to: 2F Bescot    
Diesel 11 0-6-0 w/e 17/10/1964 12091 Transfer in from: 2C Stourbridge Junction    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 24/10/1964 46428 Transfer out to: 2L Leamington    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 11/1964 42946 Transfer in from: 2B Nuneaton    
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 w/e 07/11/1964 45512 Transfer out to: 12A Carlisle Kingmoor    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 05/12/1964 47437 Transfer in from: 6A Chester (Midland)    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 04/1965 42946 Transfer out to: 2B Oxley    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 04/1965 42957 Transfer out to: 2B Oxley    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 04/1965 42983 Transfer out to: 2B Oxley    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 17/04/1965 42062 Transfer out to: 2J Aston    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 17/04/1965 42604 Transfer out to: 2J Aston    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 17/04/1965 45310 Transfer out to: 2J Aston    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 17/04/1965 45405 Transfer out to: 2J Aston    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 17/04/1965 45439 Transfer out to: 2J Aston    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 17/04/1965 47437 Transfer out to: 2F Bescot    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 02/10/1965 45308 Transfer out to: 2D Banbury