Depot: Cambridge
Type | Class | Wheels | Period | Date | Number | Event | Code | Depot | Length of Stay | Notes |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | C2 | 4-4-2 | y/e | 1923 | 252 | Snapshot | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | C2 | 4-4-2 | y/e | 1923 | 253 | Snapshot | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | C2 | 4-4-2 | y/e | 1923 | 949 | Snapshot | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | m/e | 05/1924 | 1631 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | m/e | 07/1924 | 1644 | Transfer in from: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | m/e | 1925 | 1676 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 15/08/1925 | 1676 | Transfer out to: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 04/01/1927 | 4656 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 04/01/1927 | 4674 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 07/01/1927 | 4653 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/05/1927 | 2136 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 04/06/1927 | 6638 | Transfer out to: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | on | 11/06/1927 | 4630 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 13/06/1927 | 4670 | Transfer in from: | LIV | Brunswick | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 27/07/1927 | 4670 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | on | 30/09/1927 | 4630 | Transfer out to: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 30/09/1927 | 4631 | Transfer out to: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 15/10/1927 | 4676 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 15/10/1927 | 4644 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 20/10/1927 | 4655 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 07/01/1928 | 4408 | Transfer in from: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 07/01/1928 | 4676 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 09/01/1928 | 4444 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 12/01/1928 | 4655 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 12/03/1928 | 4444 | Transfer out to: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 14/04/1928 | 4667 | Transfer in from: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 23/05/1928 | 4671 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 24/05/1928 | 4408 | Transfer out to: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 04/06/1928 | 4653 | Transfer out to: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 04/06/1928 | 4671 | Transfer out to: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 23/07/1928 | 4653 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 20/09/1928 | 4404 | Transfer in from: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 03/11/1928 | 4674 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 22/11/1928 | 4430 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 20/12/1928 | 4402 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 18/01/1929 | 4663 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 05/03/1929 | 4663 | Transfer out to: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 16/03/1929 | 3297 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 02/05/1929 | 4667 | Transfer out to: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 03/05/1929 | 4653 | Transfer out to: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 07/05/1929 | 4441 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 25/10/1931 | 6498 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 25/10/1931 | 6506 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 25/10/1931 | 6520 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 25/10/1931 | 6527 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 09/06/1932 | 6204 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 09/06/1932 | 6593 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 11/08/1932 | 6284 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/08/1932 | 6360 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 28/08/1932 | 6284 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 29/08/1932 | 6360 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 09/03/1933 | 4404 | Transfer out to: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 19/07/1933 | 4439 | Transfer in from: | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 29/10/1934 | 4440 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 29/10/1934 | 4441 | Transfer out to: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 07/11/1934 | 4441 | Transfer in from: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 07/11/1934 | 4440 | Transfer out to: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 04/01/1935 | 4440 | Transfer in from: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 04/01/1935 | 4441 | Transfer out to: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 08/05/1935 | 6364 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 02/08/1935 | 6364 | Transfer out to: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | Y3 | 0-4-0T | m/e | 11/1935 | 78 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | J68 | 0-6-0T | m/e | 12/1935 | 7050 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | m/e | 12/1935 | 7190 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 06/03/1936 | 4646 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 19/03/1936 | 4640 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 14/04/1936 | 6593 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 04/10/1936 | 4687 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 06/10/1936 | 4646 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 21/10/1936 | 4671 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 07/11/1936 | 4640 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 05/12/1936 | 6520 | Transfer out to: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 05/12/1936 | 6527 | Transfer out to: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 26/04/1938 | 4416 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 01/10/1938 | 4671 | Transfer out to: | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 01/10/1938 | 4687 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 05/10/1938 | 4440 | Transfer out to: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 01/01/1939 | 3297 | Transfer out to: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 04/01/1939 | 4402 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 15/03/1939 | 4656 | Transfer out to: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 25/06/1939 | 4430 | Transfer out to: | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 21/09/1939 | 4416 | Transfer out to: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 29/09/1939 | 4439 | Transfer out to: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 12/12/1940 | 1259 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 12/12/1940 | 2708 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 09/03/1941 | 1259 | Transfer out to: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 09/03/1941 | 2708 | Transfer out to: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 19/09/1941 | 6204 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/10/1941 | 6506 | Transfer out to: | RET | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 16/03/1942 | 6498 | Transfer out to: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 13/07/1944 | 8304 | Transfer in from: | IPS | Ipswich | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 11/12/1944 | 8301 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 28/09/1945 | 8304 | Transfer out to: | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 29/09/1945 | 8301 | Transfer out to: | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-8-0T | on | 01/10/1945 | 5961 | Transfer in from: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 03/02/1946 | 8306 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 04/05/1946 | 1042 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 22/07/1946 | 1042 | Transfer out to: | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 24/07/1946 | 1003 | Transfer in from: | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 24/07/1946 | 1004 | Transfer in from: | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 24/07/1946 | 1005 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 24/01/1947 | 1004 | Transfer out to: | PKS | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 31/01/1947 | 1003 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 22/12/1947 | 3704 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 22/12/1947 | 3705 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 22/12/1947 | 3708 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 22/12/1947 | 3718 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 22/12/1947 | 3724 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 22/12/1947 | 3730 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 22/12/1947 | 3779 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 22/12/1947 | 3836 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 22/12/1947 | 3839 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 22/12/1947 | 3880 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 22/12/1947 | 3897 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 22/12/1947 | 3898 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 22/12/1947 | 3904 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 22/12/1947 | 3913 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1608 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1610 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1611 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1613 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | B2 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1617 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1619 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1620 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1621 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1622 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1623 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1624 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1627 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1628 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1631 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1633 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1637 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1638 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1640 | Snapshot | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1641 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1642 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1643 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1654 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1663 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1665 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1666 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2516 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2525 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2527 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2530 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2531 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2536 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2549 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2551 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2557 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2567 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2571 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2574 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2601 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2606 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2607 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2618 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | E4 | 2-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2780 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | E4 | 2-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2781 | Snapshot | Dar | Barnard Castle | ||
Steam | E4 | 2-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2783 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | E4 | 2-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2784 | Snapshot | DAR | Darlington | ||
Steam | E4 | 2-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2786 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | E4 | 2-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2788 | Snapshot | DAR | Darlington | ||
Steam | E4 | 2-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2790 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | E4 | 2-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2791 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | E4 | 2-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2794 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | E4 | 2-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2796 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | E4 | 2-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2796 | Snapshot | KBY | Kirkby Stephen | ||
Steam | B2 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2871 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J20 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4676 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J20 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4678 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J20 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4679 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J20 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4680 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J20 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4683 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J20 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4684 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J20 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4687 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5350 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5356 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5364 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5366 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5369 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5371 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5379 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5380 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5383 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5391 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5399 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5405 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5406 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5410 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5412 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5413 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5438 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5451 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5457 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5461 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5474 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5477 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5501 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5502 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5503 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5506 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5517 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5520 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5535 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5537 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5546 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5563 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5575 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5585 | Snapshot | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | Y3 | 0-4-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 68176 | Snapshot | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | F3 | 2-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7115 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | F3 | 2-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7117 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7360 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7367 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7375 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7385 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J65 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8214 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J66 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8372 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8516 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8517 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8530 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8536 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8583 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8597 | Snapshot | SL | South Lynn | ||
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8609 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J68 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8645 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J68 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8646 | Snapshot | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | on | 13/01/1948 | 5380 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 17/01/1948 | 2536 | Transfer out to: | KL | Kings Lynn | ||
Steam | J65 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 17/01/1948 | 8214 | Transfer out to: | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 24/01/1948 | 2536 | Transfer in from: | KL | Kings Lynn | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 24/01/1948 | 5525 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 24/01/1948 | 5538 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 24/01/1948 | 5547 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | on | 06/02/1948 | 5383 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | on | 06/02/1948 | 5410 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 08/02/1948 | 3897 | Transfer out to: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 09/02/1948 | 1285 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 11/02/1948 | 1286 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 13/02/1948 | 1287 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | J20 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 14/02/1948 | 4676 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | F4 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 21/02/1948 | 7160 | Transfer in from: | BSE | Bury St Edmunds | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 21/02/1948 | 8579 | Transfer in from: | BSE | Bury St Edmunds | ||
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 28/02/1948 | 8509 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 28/02/1948 | 2571 | Transfer out to: | KL | Kings Lynn | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 06/03/1948 | 2571 | Transfer in from: | KL | Kings Lynn | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 06/03/1948 | 5532 | Transfer in from: | SL | South Lynn | ||
Steam | J20 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 06/03/1948 | 4680 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 06/03/1948 | 8517 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | on | 12/03/1948 | 5399 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 13/03/1948 | 1611 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 17/03/1948 | 1301 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 20/03/1948 | 8536 | Transfer out to: | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 22/03/1948 | 1302 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 27/03/1948 | 1610 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 27/03/1948 | 2516 | Transfer out to: | KL | Kings Lynn | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 29/03/1948 | 3704 | Transfer out to: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 29/03/1948 | 3705 | Transfer out to: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 29/03/1948 | 3718 | Transfer out to: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 29/03/1948 | 3724 | Transfer out to: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 29/03/1948 | 3730 | Transfer out to: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/04/1948 | 1613 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J70 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 17/04/1948 | 8222 | Transfer in from: | KL | Kings Lynn | ||
Steam | J70 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 24/04/1948 | 8218 | Transfer in from: | KL | Kings Lynn | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 24/04/1948 | 2549 | Transfer out to: | KL | Kings Lynn | ||
Steam | F3 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 24/04/1948 | 7117 | Transfer out to: | SL | South Lynn | ||
Steam | F3 | 2-4-2T | on | 13/05/1948 | 7115 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 15/05/1948 | 2516 | Transfer in from: | KL | Kings Lynn | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 15/05/1948 | 2549 | Transfer in from: | KL | Kings Lynn | ||
Steam | F4 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 22/05/1948 | 7221 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 22/05/1948 | 2607 | Transfer out to: | SL | South Lynn | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 29/05/1948 | 2607 | Transfer in from: | SL | South Lynn | ||
Steam | J70 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 12/06/1948 | 8222 | Transfer out to: | KL | Kings Lynn | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 19/06/1948 | 2601 | Transfer out to: | KL | Kings Lynn | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 26/06/1948 | 1625 | Transfer in from: | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | J70 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 26/06/1948 | 8218 | Transfer out to: | KL | Kings Lynn | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 30/06/1948 | 61332 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 02/07/1948 | 61333 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 03/07/1948 | 61665 | Transfer out to: | IPS | Ipswich | ||
Steam | F4 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 03/07/1948 | 7221 | Transfer out to: | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 11/07/1948 | 61332 | Transfer out to: | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 11/07/1948 | 61333 | Transfer out to: | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | w/e | 07/08/1948 | 67354 | Transfer in from: | MC | Melton Constable | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 15/08/1948 | 61333 | Transfer in from: | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 15/08/1948 | 61334 | Transfer in from: | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 21/08/1948 | 61333 | Transfer in from: | CAM | Cambridge | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 21/08/1948 | 61334 | Transfer in from: | CAM | Cambridge | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 21/08/1948 | 61333 | Transfer out to: | CAM | Cambridge | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 21/08/1948 | 61334 | Transfer out to: | CAM | Cambridge | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 29/08/1948 | 61333 | Transfer out to: | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 09/10/1948 | 1644 | Transfer in from: | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 09/10/1948 | 61659 | Transfer in from: | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | w/e | 16/10/1948 | 67354 | Transfer out to: | ||||
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 16/10/1948 | 8509 | Transfer out to: | SL | South Lynn | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-8-0T | on | 21/10/1948 | 69926 | Transfer out to: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | on | 31/10/1948 | 2525 | Transfer out to: | SL | South Lynn | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 15/11/1948 | 61333 | Transfer in from: | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 20/11/1948 | 61333 | Transfer in from: | CAM | Cambridge | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 20/11/1948 | 61333 | Transfer out to: | CAM | Cambridge | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/11/1948 | 1644 | Transfer out to: | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 27/11/1948 | 2606 | Transfer out to: | KL | Kings Lynn | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/11/1948 | 61659 | Transfer out to: | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 27/11/1948 | 62571 | Transfer out to: | SL | South Lynn | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/11/1948 | 65412 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | on | 08/12/1948 | 8530 | Transfer out to: | SL | South Lynn | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | on | 21/12/1948 | 8530 | Transfer in from: | SL | South Lynn | ||
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 25/12/1948 | 8509 | Transfer in from: | SL | South Lynn | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/12/1948 | 61620 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/12/1948 | 61643 | Transfer out to: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 22/01/1949 | 2525 | Transfer in from: | KL | Kings Lynn | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/01/1949 | 61643 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | J66 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 22/01/1949 | 8378 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 26/02/1949 | 61537 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | on | 06/03/1949 | 65585 | Transfer out to: | KL | Kings Lynn | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | on | 13/03/1949 | 65585 | Transfer in from: | KL | Kings Lynn | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 21/03/1949 | 1300 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/03/1949 | 1300 | Transfer in from: | CAM | Cambridge | ||
Steam | E4 | 2-4-0 | 4w/e | 26/03/1949 | 2785 | Transfer in from: | BSE | Bury St Edmunds | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/03/1949 | 7124 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/03/1949 | 1300 | Transfer out to: | CAM | Cambridge | ||
Steam | E4 | 2-4-0 | 4w/e | 26/03/1949 | 2780 | Transfer out to: | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/03/1949 | 61537 | Transfer out to: | SL | South Lynn | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/04/1949 | 61622 | Transfer out to: | IPS | Ipswich | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/04/1949 | 5372 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | F4 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 23/04/1949 | 7187 | Transfer in from: | BSE | Bury St Edmunds | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 30/04/1949 | 65366 | Transfer out to: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 22/05/1949 | 3904 | Transfer out to: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 22/05/1949 | 3913 | Transfer out to: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 06/1949 | 65364 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 04/06/1949 | 5561 | Transfer in from: | SL | South Lynn | ||
Steam | F1 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 04/06/1949 | 5589 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | E4 | 2-4-0 | w/e | 18/06/1949 | 2796 | Transfer out to: | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 07/1949 | 5475 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | F6 | 2-4-2T | m/e | 07/1949 | 7238 | Transfer in from: | BSE | Bury St Edmunds | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | m/e | 07/1949 | 62607 | Transfer out to: | BSE | Bury St Edmunds | ||
Steam | E4 | 2-4-0 | m/e | 07/1949 | 62786 | Transfer out to: | BSE | Bury St Edmunds | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/1949 | 65369 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 09/07/1949 | 5475 | Transfer in from: | CAM | Cambridge | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 09/07/1949 | 5475 | Transfer out to: | CAM | Cambridge | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 30/07/1949 | 61622 | Transfer in from: | IPS | Ipswich | ||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | w/e | 13/08/1949 | 7367 | Transfer out to: | ||||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 27/08/1949 | 7124 | Transfer out to: | ||||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 09/1949 | 65372 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 09/1949 | 65379 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | F4 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 03/09/1949 | 7187 | Transfer out to: | SL | South Lynn | ||
Steam | F4 | 2-4-2T | on | 07/09/1949 | 7187 | Transfer in from: | SL | South Lynn | ||
Steam | F4 | 2-4-2T | on | 09/09/1949 | 7187 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | F4 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 17/09/1949 | 67160 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 08/10/1949 | 65425 | Transfer in from: | KL | Kings Lynn | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 08/10/1949 | 65529 | Transfer in from: | KL | Kings Lynn | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 08/10/1949 | 62530 | Transfer out to: | KL | Kings Lynn | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 08/10/1949 | 62551 | Transfer out to: | KL | Kings Lynn | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 15/10/1949 | 62551 | Transfer in from: | KL | Kings Lynn | ||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | w/e | 15/10/1949 | 7367 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 15/10/1949 | 7385 | Transfer in from: | IPS | Ipswich | ||
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | on | 18/10/1949 | 68583 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 05/11/1949 | 5475 | Transfer in from: | CAM | Cambridge | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 05/11/1949 | 62530 | Transfer in from: | KL | Kings Lynn | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 05/11/1949 | 65573 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 05/11/1949 | 65587 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 05/11/1949 | 5475 | Transfer out to: | CAM | Cambridge | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 20/11/1949 | 1036 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 20/11/1949 | 61121 | Transfer in from: | LIN | Lincoln | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 26/11/1949 | 61121 | Transfer in from: | CAM | Cambridge | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 26/11/1949 | 61645 | Transfer in from: | IPS | Ipswich | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 26/11/1949 | 61121 | Transfer out to: | CAM | Cambridge | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 27/11/1949 | 63708 | Transfer out to: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 27/11/1949 | 63839 | Transfer out to: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | m/e | 30/11/1949 | 61645 | Transfer in from: | CAM | Cambridge | ||
Steam | E4 | 2-4-0 | m/e | 30/11/1949 | 62781 | Transfer in from: | CAM | Cambridge | ||
Steam | F6 | 2-4-2T | m/e | 30/11/1949 | 7238 | Transfer in from: | CAM | Cambridge | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | m/e | 30/11/1949 | 61645 | Transfer out to: | CAM | Cambridge | ||
Steam | E4 | 2-4-0 | m/e | 30/11/1949 | 62781 | Transfer out to: | CAM | Cambridge | ||
Steam | F6 | 2-4-2T | m/e | 30/11/1949 | 7238 | Transfer out to: | CAM | Cambridge | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 12/1949 | 65371 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 01/12/1949 | 63836 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 02/12/1949 | 1036 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | E4 | 2-4-0 | w/e | 17/12/1949 | 62781 | Transfer in from: | CAM | Cambridge | ||
Steam | F4 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 17/12/1949 | 7238 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | E4 | 2-4-0 | w/e | 17/12/1949 | 62781 | Transfer out to: | CAM | Cambridge | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/12/1949 | 63880 | Transfer out to: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | F4 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 24/12/1949 | 7238 | Transfer out to: | ||||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 31/12/1949 | 61666 | Transfer out to: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | F6 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 07/01/1950 | 67221 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 11/01/1950 | 63779 | Transfer out to: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 13/01/1950 | 63898 | Transfer out to: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | F6 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 21/01/1950 | 67222 | Transfer in from: | KL | Kings Lynn | ||
Steam | F6 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 21/01/1950 | 67221 | Transfer out to: | KL | Kings Lynn | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 05/02/1950 | 61206 | Transfer in from: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 26/03/1950 | 61206 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 16/04/1950 | 61627 | Transfer in from: | CAM | Cambridge | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 16/04/1950 | 61643 | Transfer in from: | CAM | Cambridge | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 16/04/1950 | 61627 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 16/04/1950 | 61643 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 3w/e | 31/05/1950 | 61620 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 3w/e | 31/05/1950 | 61636 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 3w/e | 31/05/1950 | 61633 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 3w/e | 31/05/1950 | 61654 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 61620 | Transfer in from: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 61636 | Transfer in from: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 63204 | Transfer in from: | 37A | Ardsley | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 63207 | Transfer in from: | 37A | Ardsley | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 63243 | Transfer in from: | 37A | Ardsley | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 61620 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 61636 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 23/07/1950 | 68561 | Transfer out to: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | E4 | 2-4-0 | w/e | 30/07/1950 | 62791 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 07/08/1950 | 63207 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/09/1950 | 61655 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/09/1950 | 61621 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/09/1950 | 61655 | Transfer in from: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/09/1950 | 61655 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0 | on | 23/10/1950 | 58214 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | on | 27/10/1950 | 43005 | Transfer in from: | 2B | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 43002 | Transfer in from: | 2B | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/11/1950 | 58194 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 25/11/1950 | 62543 | Transfer in from: | SL | South Lynn | ||
Steam | E4 | 2-4-0 | 4w/e | 25/11/1950 | 62790 | Transfer out to: | 31C | Kings Lynn | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | on | 25/11/1950 | 65413 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 62543 | Transfer in from: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 62543 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/12/1950 | 61652 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/12/1950 | 61653 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 23/12/1950 | 62603 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | 4w/e | 23/12/1950 | 67389 | Transfer in from: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | m/e | 31/12/1950 | 61653 | Transfer in from: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | m/e | 31/12/1950 | 62603 | Transfer in from: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | m/e | 31/12/1950 | 67389 | Transfer in from: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0 | m/e | 31/12/1950 | 58194 | Transfer out to: | 15C | Leicester Midland | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | m/e | 31/12/1950 | 61653 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | m/e | 31/12/1950 | 62603 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | m/e | 31/12/1950 | 67389 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/01/1951 | 65580 | Transfer in from: | SL | South Lynn | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/01/1951 | 65588 | Transfer in from: | SL | South Lynn | ||
Steam | J20 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/01/1951 | 64684 | Transfer out to: | 34B | Hornsey | ||
Steam | F1 | 2-4-2T | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 5588 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 65580 | Transfer in from: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 65580 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 02/1951 | 65350 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J66 | 0-6-0T | m/e | 02/1951 | 68372 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J20 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 04/02/1951 | 64678 | Transfer out to: | 34B | Hornsey | ||
Steam | J20 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 04/02/1951 | 64679 | Transfer out to: | 34B | Hornsey | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 04/03/1951 | 61227 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | on | 11/03/1951 | 62036 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | on | 11/03/1951 | 62039 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 24/03/1951 | 61657 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | m/e | 31/03/1951 | 61227 | Transfer in from: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | m/e | 31/03/1951 | 61657 | Transfer in from: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | m/e | 31/03/1951 | 62036 | Transfer in from: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | m/e | 31/03/1951 | 62039 | Transfer in from: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | m/e | 31/03/1951 | 61227 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | m/e | 31/03/1951 | 61657 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | m/e | 31/03/1951 | 62036 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | m/e | 31/03/1951 | 62039 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 04/1951 | 65406 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | on | 01/04/1951 | 62039 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/04/1951 | 61621 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | on | 08/04/1951 | 62036 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 61621 | Transfer in from: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 62558 | Transfer in from: | SL | South Lynn | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 62615 | Transfer in from: | BSE | Bury St Edmunds | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 61621 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 05/05/1951 | 61621 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | w/e | 05/05/1951 | 67389 | Transfer out to: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 06/05/1951 | 61227 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 12/05/1951 | 65505 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | J20 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 12/05/1951 | 64683 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | J20 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 12/05/1951 | 64687 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 65505 | Transfer in from: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 65505 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 26/05/1951 | 62565 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 26/05/1951 | 62572 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 26/05/1951 | 65390 | Transfer in from: | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 26/05/1951 | 65472 | Transfer in from: | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | m/e | 06/1951 | 46465 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | m/e | 06/1951 | 46466 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | m/e | 06/1951 | 46467 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/06/1951 | 65472 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 5w/e | 23/06/1951 | 62565 | Transfer in from: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 5w/e | 23/06/1951 | 62572 | Transfer in from: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 23/06/1951 | 65390 | Transfer in from: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 5w/e | 23/06/1951 | 62565 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 5w/e | 23/06/1951 | 62572 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 23/06/1951 | 65390 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 25/06/1951 | 63204 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 62572 | Transfer out to: | 31C | Kings Lynn | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 3w/e | 28/07/1951 | 67269 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 3w/e | 28/07/1951 | 67279 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 3w/e | 28/07/1951 | 67322 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 11/08/1951 | 62565 | Transfer out to: | 31C | Kings Lynn | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 18/08/1951 | 67269 | Transfer in from: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 18/08/1951 | 67279 | Transfer in from: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 18/08/1951 | 67322 | Transfer in from: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 18/08/1951 | 67269 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 18/08/1951 | 67279 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 18/08/1951 | 67322 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | on | 03/09/1951 | 62603 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 61638 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | E4 | 2-4-0 | 5w/e | 22/09/1951 | 2796 | Transfer in from: | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 22/09/1951 | 65545 | Transfer in from: | SL | South Lynn | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 22/09/1951 | 65562 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 22/09/1951 | 65538 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | E4 | 2-4-0 | w/e | 29/09/1951 | 62780 | Transfer in from: | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | E4 | 2-4-0 | w/e | 29/09/1951 | 62788 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 06/10/1951 | 65533 | Transfer in from: | SL | South Lynn | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 06/10/1951 | 65573 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 13/10/1951 | 62558 | Transfer out to: | 31C | Kings Lynn | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 13/10/1951 | 65517 | Transfer out to: | 31E | Bury St Edmunds | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 15/10/1951 | 63243 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | E4 | 2-4-0 | 4w/e | 20/10/1951 | 62780 | Transfer in from: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | J20 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/10/1951 | 64683 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | J20 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/10/1951 | 64688 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | J20 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/10/1951 | 64689 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/10/1951 | 65533 | Transfer in from: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | E4 | 2-4-0 | 4w/e | 20/10/1951 | 62780 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/10/1951 | 65533 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/10/1951 | 65547 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/10/1951 | 65580 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 03/11/1951 | 43094 | Transfer in from: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 03/11/1951 | 61631 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 17/11/1951 | 62518 | Transfer in from: | KL | Kings Lynn | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 17/11/1951 | 62516 | Transfer out to: | 31C | Kings Lynn | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 01/12/1951 | 65545 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 01/12/1951 | 65588 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 65356 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/01/1952 | 65525 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/01/1952 | 65546 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/01/1952 | 65563 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | F6 | 2-4-2T | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 67227 | Transfer in from: | 31D | South Lynn | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 61636 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 61643 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 65501 | Transfer out to: | 31C | Kings Lynn | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 16/02/1952 | 65512 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 16/02/1952 | 65517 | Transfer in from: | 31E | Bury St Edmunds | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 16/02/1952 | 65565 | Transfer in from: | 31E | Bury St Edmunds | ||
Steam | F6 | 2-4-2T | 5w/e | 16/02/1952 | 67227 | Transfer in from: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 5w/e | 16/02/1952 | 62557 | Transfer out to: | 31C | Kings Lynn | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 16/02/1952 | 65533 | Transfer out to: | 33A | Plaistow | ||
Steam | F6 | 2-4-2T | 5w/e | 16/02/1952 | 67227 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 61636 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J20 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 64694 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 65512 | Transfer in from: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 65517 | Transfer in from: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 65565 | Transfer in from: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 65512 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 65517 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 65565 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 62558 | Transfer in from: | 31C | Kings Lynn | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 62616 | Transfer in from: | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | E4 | 2-4-0 | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 62786 | Transfer in from: | BSE | Bury St Edmunds | ||
Steam | J20 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 64694 | Transfer in from: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 62518 | Transfer out to: | 31C | Kings Lynn | ||
Steam | E4 | 2-4-0 | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 62794 | Transfer out to: | 31E | Bury St Edmunds | ||
Steam | J20 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 64694 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 62525 | Transfer out to: | 31C | Kings Lynn | ||
Steam | J20 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 64694 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 65503 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 67375 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | E4 | 2-4-0 | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 62794 | Transfer in from: | 31E | Bury St Edmunds | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 65584 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 62551 | Transfer out to: | 31C | Kings Lynn | ||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | on | 18/05/1952 | 62019 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | on | 25/05/1952 | 62019 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 61631 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 62532 | Transfer in from: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 62535 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 62536 | Transfer in from: | CAM | Cambridge | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 62551 | Transfer in from: | 31C | Kings Lynn | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 62587 | Transfer in from: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 62609 | Transfer in from: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 62536 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 62558 | Transfer out to: | 31C | Kings Lynn | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 65390 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 65585 | Transfer out to: | 31C | Kings Lynn | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 21/06/1952 | 61631 | Transfer in from: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 5w/e | 21/06/1952 | 62532 | Transfer in from: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 5w/e | 21/06/1952 | 62535 | Transfer in from: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 5w/e | 21/06/1952 | 62536 | Transfer in from: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 5w/e | 21/06/1952 | 62551 | Transfer in from: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 5w/e | 21/06/1952 | 62587 | Transfer in from: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 5w/e | 21/06/1952 | 62609 | Transfer in from: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | E4 | 2-4-0 | 5w/e | 21/06/1952 | 62790 | Transfer in from: | 31C | Kings Lynn | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 21/06/1952 | 61631 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 5w/e | 21/06/1952 | 62532 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 5w/e | 21/06/1952 | 62535 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 5w/e | 21/06/1952 | 62536 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 5w/e | 21/06/1952 | 62551 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 5w/e | 21/06/1952 | 62587 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 5w/e | 21/06/1952 | 62609 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 07/07/1952 | 62527 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 62562 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 62568 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 62585 | Transfer in from: | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 62599 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | E4 | 2-4-0 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 62790 | Transfer in from: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 61631 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 61655 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 62609 | Transfer out to: | 31D | South Lynn | ||
Steam | E4 | 2-4-0 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 62783 | Transfer out to: | 31E | Bury St Edmunds | ||
Steam | E4 | 2-4-0 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 62790 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 19/07/1952 | 62562 | Transfer in from: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 19/07/1952 | 62568 | Transfer in from: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 19/07/1952 | 62585 | Transfer in from: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 19/07/1952 | 62599 | Transfer in from: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 19/07/1952 | 62562 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 19/07/1952 | 62568 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 19/07/1952 | 62585 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 19/07/1952 | 62599 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 65548 | Transfer in from: | 31E | Bury St Edmunds | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 62551 | Transfer out to: | 31C | Kings Lynn | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 62562 | Transfer out to: | 31C | Kings Lynn | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 62585 | Transfer out to: | 31E | Bury St Edmunds | ||
Steam | F6 | 2-4-2T | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 67222 | Transfer out to: | 31E | Bury St Edmunds | ||
Steam | F6 | 2-4-2T | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 67238 | Transfer out to: | 31E | Bury St Edmunds | ||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 67385 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 23/08/1952 | 65390 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 23/08/1952 | 65442 | Transfer in from: | BSE | Bury St Edmunds | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 23/08/1952 | 65548 | Transfer in from: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 5w/e | 23/08/1952 | 62543 | Transfer out to: | 31E | Bury St Edmunds | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 5w/e | 23/08/1952 | 62615 | Transfer out to: | 31E | Bury St Edmunds | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 23/08/1952 | 65391 | Transfer out to: | 31E | Bury St Edmunds | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 23/08/1952 | 65405 | Transfer out to: | 31E | Bury St Edmunds | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 23/08/1952 | 65438 | Transfer out to: | 31E | Bury St Edmunds | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 23/08/1952 | 65548 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | J66 | 0-6-0T | m/e | 09/1952 | 68378 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 65390 | Transfer in from: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 65442 | Transfer in from: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 65390 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 65442 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | on | 15/09/1952 | 61628 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/09/1952 | 61643 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 20/09/1952 | 62562 | Transfer in from: | 31C | Kings Lynn | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 20/09/1952 | 68579 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 61643 | Transfer in from: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 62609 | Transfer in from: | 31D | South Lynn | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 65518 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 61643 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 62562 | Transfer out to: | 35C | Spital Bridge | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 62568 | Transfer out to: | 31D | South Lynn | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 65520 | Transfer out to: | 31E | Bury St Edmunds | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 65561 | Transfer out to: | 31E | Bury St Edmunds | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 65587 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/10/1952 | 61656 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 18/10/1952 | 62585 | Transfer in from: | 31E | Bury St Edmunds | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/10/1952 | 65518 | Transfer in from: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/10/1952 | 43094 | Transfer out to: | 31D | South Lynn | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/10/1952 | 61619 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/10/1952 | 61620 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/10/1952 | 61624 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 18/10/1952 | 62532 | Transfer out to: | 35C | Spital Bridge | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 18/10/1952 | 62535 | Transfer out to: | 35C | Spital Bridge | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 18/10/1952 | 62587 | Transfer out to: | 35C | Spital Bridge | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 18/10/1952 | 62599 | Transfer out to: | 35C | Spital Bridge | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 18/10/1952 | 62609 | Transfer out to: | 35C | Spital Bridge | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/10/1952 | 65518 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 18/10/1952 | 68609 | Transfer out to: | 31E | Bury St Edmunds | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 61656 | Transfer in from: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 62525 | Transfer in from: | 31C | Kings Lynn | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 62551 | Transfer in from: | 31C | Kings Lynn | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 62557 | Transfer in from: | 31C | Kings Lynn | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 62558 | Transfer in from: | 31C | Kings Lynn | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 62562 | Transfer in from: | 35C | Spital Bridge | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 62585 | Transfer in from: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 65391 | Transfer in from: | 31E | Bury St Edmunds | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 65405 | Transfer in from: | 31E | Bury St Edmunds | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 65438 | Transfer in from: | 31E | Bury St Edmunds | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 61656 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 62536 | Transfer out to: | 35C | Spital Bridge | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 62585 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 67360 | Transfer out to: | 31E | Bury St Edmunds | ||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 67367 | Transfer out to: | 31E | Bury St Edmunds | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 15/11/1952 | 62525 | Transfer in from: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 15/11/1952 | 62551 | Transfer in from: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 15/11/1952 | 62557 | Transfer in from: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 15/11/1952 | 62558 | Transfer in from: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | E4 | 2-4-0 | 4w/e | 15/11/1952 | 62791 | Transfer in from: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 15/11/1952 | 65391 | Transfer in from: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 15/11/1952 | 65405 | Transfer in from: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 15/11/1952 | 65438 | Transfer in from: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 15/11/1952 | 65534 | Transfer in from: | LOW | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 15/11/1952 | 65568 | Transfer in from: | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | F6 | 2-4-2T | 4w/e | 15/11/1952 | 67237 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 15/11/1952 | 62525 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 15/11/1952 | 62551 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 15/11/1952 | 62557 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 15/11/1952 | 62558 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 15/11/1952 | 65391 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 15/11/1952 | 65405 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 15/11/1952 | 65438 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 15/11/1952 | 65529 | Transfer out to: | 31C | Kings Lynn | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 15/11/1952 | 65584 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | E4 | 2-4-0 | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 62791 | Transfer in from: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 65534 | Transfer in from: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 65568 | Transfer in from: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | F6 | 2-4-2T | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 67221 | Transfer in from: | 31E | Bury St Edmunds | ||
Steam | F6 | 2-4-2T | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 67237 | Transfer in from: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | E4 | 2-4-0 | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 62791 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 65534 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 65568 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | F6 | 2-4-2T | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 67237 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | F6 | 2-4-2T | 4w/e | 13/12/1952 | 67221 | Transfer in from: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 13/12/1952 | 61643 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | F6 | 2-4-2T | 4w/e | 13/12/1952 | 67221 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 65520 | Transfer in from: | 31E | Bury St Edmunds | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 65561 | Transfer in from: | 31E | Bury St Edmunds | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 17/01/1953 | 65520 | Transfer in from: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 17/01/1953 | 65561 | Transfer in from: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 17/01/1953 | 65520 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 17/01/1953 | 65561 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 14/02/1953 | 68609 | Transfer in from: | 31E | Bury St Edmunds | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | on | 23/02/1953 | 62616 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 21/03/1953 | 61630 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 21/03/1953 | 65562 | Transfer out to: | 31D | South Lynn | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 62521 | Transfer in from: | YAR | Yarmouth South Town | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 65504 | Transfer in from: | 31C | Kings Lynn | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 65547 | Transfer in from: | 31C | Kings Lynn | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 61630 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 65518 | Transfer out to: | 31C | Kings Lynn | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 65568 | Transfer out to: | 31C | Kings Lynn | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 20/06/1953 | 62570 | Transfer in from: | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 20/06/1953 | 62576 | Transfer in from: | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | E4 | 2-4-0 | 4w/e | 20/06/1953 | 62783 | Transfer in from: | 31E | Bury St Edmunds | ||
Steam | F6 | 2-4-2T | 4w/e | 20/06/1953 | 67238 | Transfer in from: | 31E | Bury St Edmunds | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/06/1953 | 61622 | Transfer out to: | 32D | Yarmouth South Town | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/06/1953 | 61625 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/06/1953 | 61637 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/06/1953 | 61656 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/06/1953 | 61663 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | E4 | 2-4-0 | 4w/e | 20/06/1953 | 62791 | Transfer out to: | 31E | Bury St Edmunds | ||
Steam | F6 | 2-4-2T | 4w/e | 20/06/1953 | 67237 | Transfer out to: | 31E | Bury St Edmunds | ||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | 4w/e | 25/07/1953 | 67360 | Transfer in from: | 31E | Bury St Edmunds | ||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | 4w/e | 25/07/1953 | 67367 | Transfer in from: | 31E | Bury St Edmunds | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 25/07/1953 | 68600 | Transfer in from: | 31C | Kings Lynn | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/07/1953 | 65517 | Transfer out to: | 31D | South Lynn | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/07/1953 | 65520 | Transfer out to: | 31D | South Lynn | ||
Steam | E4 | 2-4-0 | 4w/e | 22/08/1953 | 62791 | Transfer in from: | 31E | Bury St Edmunds | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 22/08/1953 | 68491 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 22/08/1953 | 68555 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 22/08/1953 | 68567 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 22/08/1953 | 68625 | Transfer in from: | YAR | Yarmouth South Town | ||
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 22/08/1953 | 68509 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 22/08/1953 | 68516 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | J68 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 22/08/1953 | 68645 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 13/09/1953 | 61333 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 19/09/1953 | 62532 | Transfer in from: | 35C | Spital Bridge | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 19/09/1953 | 62609 | Transfer in from: | 35C | Spital Bridge | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 43002 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 43005 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/10/1953 | 65585 | Transfer in from: | 31C | Kings Lynn | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/10/1953 | 65391 | Transfer out to: | 31E | Bury St Edmunds | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/10/1953 | 65405 | Transfer out to: | 31E | Bury St Edmunds | ||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | 4w/e | 24/10/1953 | 67360 | Transfer out to: | 31C | Kings Lynn | ||
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 24/10/1953 | 68555 | Transfer out to: | 31E | Bury St Edmunds | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 24/10/1953 | 68567 | Transfer out to: | 31C | Kings Lynn | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/11/1953 | 61645 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | 4w/e | 21/11/1953 | 67367 | Transfer out to: | 31C | Kings Lynn | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 19/12/1953 | 62609 | Transfer out to: | 35C | Spital Bridge | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/01/1954 | 65587 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 23/01/1954 | 62551 | Transfer out to: | 35C | Spital Bridge | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/02/1954 | 65580 | Transfer in from: | 31E | Bury St Edmunds | ||
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 20/02/1954 | 68555 | Transfer in from: | 31E | Bury St Edmunds | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 20/02/1954 | 68567 | Transfer in from: | 31C | Kings Lynn | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 20/03/1954 | 62541 | Transfer in from: | 31E | Bury St Edmunds | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 20/03/1954 | 62545 | Transfer in from: | 31E | Bury St Edmunds | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/03/1954 | 65520 | Transfer in from: | 31D | South Lynn | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 20/03/1954 | 62562 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 20/03/1954 | 62576 | Transfer out to: | 31E | Bury St Edmunds | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 20/06/1954 | 61160 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 20/06/1954 | 61223 | Transfer in from: | 39A | Gorton | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 24/07/1954 | 61627 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | on | 06/09/1954 | 65547 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/09/1954 | 43089 | Transfer in from: | 34E | Neasden | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/10/1954 | 65532 | Transfer out to: | 31E | Bury St Edmunds | ||
Steam | F6 | 2-4-2T | 4w/e | 23/10/1954 | 67221 | Transfer out to: | 31C | Kings Lynn | ||
Steam | F6 | 2-4-2T | 4w/e | 23/10/1954 | 67227 | Transfer out to: | 31C | Kings Lynn | ||
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 23/10/1954 | 68555 | Transfer out to: | 31D | South Lynn | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 23/10/1954 | 68625 | Transfer out to: | 31E | Bury St Edmunds | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 24/10/1954 | 61033 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 01/11/1954 | 65585 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 13/11/1954 | 62607 | Transfer in from: | BSE | Bury St Edmunds | ||
Steam | E4 | 2-4-0 | w/e | 13/12/1954 | 62783 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J20 | 0-6-0 | 6w/e | 25/12/1954 | 64693 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | J20 | 0-6-0 | 6w/e | 25/12/1954 | 64694 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | F6 | 2-4-2T | 6w/e | 25/12/1954 | 67221 | Transfer in from: | 31C | Kings Lynn | ||
Steam | F6 | 2-4-2T | 6w/e | 25/12/1954 | 67227 | Transfer in from: | 31C | Kings Lynn | ||
Steam | E4 | 2-4-0 | 6w/e | 25/12/1954 | 62785 | Transfer out to: | 34D | Hitchin (GNR) | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/02/1955 | 65500 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/02/1955 | 65532 | Transfer in from: | 31E | Bury St Edmunds | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/02/1955 | 65589 | Transfer in from: | 31E | Bury St Edmunds | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 19/02/1955 | 68625 | Transfer in from: | 31E | Bury St Edmunds | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/02/1955 | 65506 | Transfer out to: | 31D | South Lynn | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/02/1955 | 65535 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | E4 | 2-4-0 | w/e | 07/03/1955 | 62795 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 19/03/1955 | 62545 | Transfer out to: | 31C | Kings Lynn | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/03/1955 | 65537 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 21/03/1955 | 62531 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | E4 | 2-4-0 | on | 04/04/1955 | 62791 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | on | 11/04/1955 | 62585 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 23/04/1955 | 65541 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | 5w/e | 23/04/1955 | 68555 | Transfer in from: | 31D | South Lynn | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 23/04/1955 | 65512 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 15/05/1955 | 64729 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 15/05/1955 | 64751 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 15/05/1955 | 64803 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | E4 | 2-4-0 | w/e | 30/05/1955 | 62784 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J20 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 18/06/1955 | 64695 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | J20 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 18/06/1955 | 64689 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J20 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 18/06/1955 | 64693 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J20 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 18/06/1955 | 64694 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 18/06/1955 | 65474 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | E4 | 2-4-0 | 4w/e | 20/08/1955 | 62792 | Transfer in from: | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | E4 | 2-4-0 | 4w/e | 20/08/1955 | 62796 | Transfer in from: | CAM | Cambridge | ||
Steam | E4 | 2-4-0 | 4w/e | 20/08/1955 | 62796 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | E4 | 2-4-0 | on | 22/08/1955 | 62794 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | on | 19/09/1955 | 62525 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 25/09/1955 | 64890 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 25/09/1955 | 64958 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | E4 | 2-4-0 | on | 26/09/1955 | 62780 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | on | 17/10/1955 | 62541 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 5w/e | 22/10/1955 | 62553 | Transfer in from: | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 5w/e | 22/10/1955 | 62608 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 5w/e | 22/10/1955 | 68567 | Transfer out to: | 31D | South Lynn | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 23/10/1955 | 61177 | Transfer in from: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 23/10/1955 | 61371 | Transfer in from: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | on | 31/10/1955 | 62557 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | F6 | 2-4-2T | on | 07/11/1955 | 67238 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 3w/e | 12/11/1955 | 62610 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 3w/e | 12/11/1955 | 68529 | Transfer in from: | 31C | Kings Lynn | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 3w/e | 12/11/1955 | 62558 | Transfer out to: | 31C | Kings Lynn | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | on | 28/11/1955 | 62607 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | on | 05/12/1955 | 62574 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | on | 12/12/1955 | 62549 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 5w/e | 17/12/1955 | 62605 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | 5w/e | 17/12/1955 | 67367 | Transfer in from: | 31C | Kings Lynn | ||
Steam | F6 | 2-4-2T | 5w/e | 17/12/1955 | 67221 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | F6 | 2-4-2T | 5w/e | 17/12/1955 | 67227 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | E4 | 2-4-0 | on | 02/01/1956 | 62781 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | E4 | 2-4-0 | on | 02/01/1956 | 62790 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | 5w/e | 21/01/1956 | 67395 | Transfer in from: | 31E | Bury St Edmunds | ||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | 5w/e | 21/01/1956 | 67397 | Transfer in from: | 31E | Bury St Edmunds | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 5w/e | 21/01/1956 | 68625 | Transfer out to: | 32G | Melton Constable | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 18/02/1956 | 68567 | Transfer in from: | 31D | South Lynn | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 24/03/1956 | 61633 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 24/03/1956 | 61657 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 5w/e | 24/03/1956 | 68529 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | 5w/e | 24/03/1956 | 68555 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 25/03/1956 | 61392 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 61634 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 68491 | Transfer out to: | 35B | Grantham | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 25/05/1956 | 62539 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/05/1956 | 65506 | Transfer in from: | 31D | South Lynn | ||
Steam | E4 | 2-4-0 | on | 18/06/1956 | 62792 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | m/e | 21/07/1956 | 62510 | Transfer in from: | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | m/e | 21/07/1956 | 62584 | Transfer in from: | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | E4 | 2-4-0 | m/e | 21/07/1956 | 62788 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | E4 | 2-4-0 | on | 30/07/1956 | 62786 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | E4 | 2-4-0 | 4w/e | 25/08/1956 | 62787 | Transfer in from: | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | E4 | 2-4-0 | 4w/e | 25/08/1956 | 62789 | Transfer in from: | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 16/09/1956 | 61286 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/10/1956 | 65425 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | on | 01/10/1956 | 67269 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 07/10/1956 | 61302 | Transfer out to: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 07/10/1956 | 61392 | Transfer out to: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/10/1956 | 61645 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/10/1956 | 61646 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 20/10/1956 | 62605 | Transfer in from: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 20/10/1956 | 68554 | Transfer in from: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 20/10/1956 | 69651 | Transfer in from: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 20/10/1956 | 69690 | Transfer in from: | 32C | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 20/10/1956 | 69692 | Transfer in from: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 20/10/1956 | 62605 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 28/10/1956 | 61033 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 28/10/1956 | 61121 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 28/10/1956 | 61160 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 28/10/1956 | 61177 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 28/10/1956 | 61285 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 28/10/1956 | 61334 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | on | 11/1956 | 67279 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | on | 11/1956 | 67322 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | on | 12/11/1956 | 62532 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B2 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/11/1956 | 61607 | Transfer in from: | COL | Colchester | ||
Steam | B2 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/11/1956 | 61614 | Transfer in from: | COL | Colchester | ||
Steam | B2 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/11/1956 | 61615 | Transfer in from: | COL | Colchester | ||
Steam | B2 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/11/1956 | 61616 | Transfer in from: | COL | Colchester | ||
Steam | B2 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/11/1956 | 61632 | Transfer in from: | COL | Colchester | ||
Steam | B2 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/11/1956 | 61639 | Transfer in from: | COL | Colchester | ||
Steam | B2 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/11/1956 | 61644 | Transfer in from: | COL | Colchester | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/11/1956 | 61608 | Transfer out to: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | E4 | 2-4-0 | on | 20/11/1956 | 62787 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B2 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 15/12/1956 | 61603 | Transfer in from: | COL | Colchester | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 15/12/1956 | 61633 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 15/12/1956 | 61645 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | on | 17/12/1956 | 62567 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1957 | 62553 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1957 | 62608 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 19/01/1957 | 61575 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 19/01/1957 | 61576 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 19/01/1957 | 61600 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 19/01/1957 | 61601 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 5w/e | 19/01/1957 | 62564 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 5w/e | 19/01/1957 | 62580 | Transfer in from: | YAR | Yarmouth South Town | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 5w/e | 19/01/1957 | 62592 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 5w/e | 19/01/1957 | 62510 | Transfer out to: | 31C | Kings Lynn | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 5w/e | 19/01/1957 | 62521 | Transfer out to: | 31C | Kings Lynn | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 5w/e | 19/01/1957 | 62584 | Transfer out to: | 31C | Kings Lynn | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/02/1957 | 61546 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/02/1957 | 61549 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 16/02/1957 | 69616 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 16/02/1957 | 69617 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 16/02/1957 | 69619 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 16/02/1957 | 69620 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/03/1957 | 61554 | Transfer in from: | 35C | Spital Bridge | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/03/1957 | 61558 | Transfer in from: | 35C | Spital Bridge | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/03/1957 | 61567 | Transfer in from: | 35C | Spital Bridge | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/03/1957 | 61573 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/03/1957 | 65506 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | on | 16/03/1957 | 67395 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 20/04/1957 | 61553 | Transfer in from: | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 20/04/1957 | 61555 | Transfer in from: | 35B | Grantham | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 20/04/1957 | 61580 | Transfer in from: | 35B | Grantham | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 5w/e | 20/04/1957 | 62521 | Transfer in from: | 31C | Kings Lynn | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 5w/e | 20/04/1957 | 62534 | Transfer in from: | 31C | Kings Lynn | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 5w/e | 20/04/1957 | 62545 | Transfer in from: | 31C | Kings Lynn | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 20/04/1957 | 61558 | Transfer out to: | 31C | Kings Lynn | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 20/04/1957 | 61575 | Transfer out to: | 31C | Kings Lynn | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 5w/e | 20/04/1957 | 62564 | Transfer out to: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 5w/e | 20/04/1957 | 62592 | Transfer out to: | 31C | Kings Lynn | ||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | 5w/e | 20/04/1957 | 67367 | Transfer out to: | 35C | Spital Bridge | ||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | 5w/e | 20/04/1957 | 67397 | Transfer out to: | 35C | Spital Bridge | ||
Steam | E4 | 2-4-0 | on | 13/05/1957 | 62796 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | E4 | 2-4-0 | 4w/e | 18/05/1957 | 62785 | Transfer in from: | 34D | Hitchin (GNR) | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 18/05/1957 | 62580 | Transfer out to: | 31C | Kings Lynn | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/05/1957 | 65390 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | on | 06/06/1957 | 62605 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 24/06/1957 | 61223 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 43087 | Transfer in from: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | E4 | 2-4-0 | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 62797 | Transfer in from: | 32C | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 65562 | Transfer in from: | 31C | Kings Lynn | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 43089 | Transfer out to: | 32G | Melton Constable | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 61600 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 61601 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 62521 | Transfer out to: | 31C | Kings Lynn | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 62570 | Transfer out to: | 32D | Yarmouth South Town | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | on | 18/08/1957 | 68567 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 5w/e | 24/08/1957 | 62534 | Transfer out to: | 31C | Kings Lynn | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 29/09/1957 | 61096 | Transfer in from: | 39B | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 29/09/1957 | 61314 | Transfer in from: | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 06/10/1957 | 61066 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | on | 07/10/1957 | 61555 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/10/1957 | 43089 | Transfer in from: | 32G | Melton Constable | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/10/1957 | 61516 | Transfer in from: | 31C | Kings Lynn | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/10/1957 | 65501 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 19/10/1957 | 62545 | Transfer out to: | 31C | Kings Lynn | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 19/10/1957 | 62610 | Transfer out to: | 31C | Kings Lynn | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 20/10/1957 | 61203 | Transfer in from: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 20/10/1957 | 61283 | Transfer in from: | 34A | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | on | 28/10/1957 | 62539 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/11/1957 | 11123 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | E4 | 2-4-0 | on | 02/12/1957 | 62789 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/12/1957 | 61558 | Transfer in from: | 31C | Kings Lynn | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/12/1957 | 61575 | Transfer in from: | 31C | Kings Lynn | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/12/1957 | 43089 | Transfer out to: | 31C | Kings Lynn | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/12/1957 | 61634 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/12/1957 | 61646 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/12/1957 | 61653 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 14/12/1957 | 62530 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | on | 09/01/1958 | D2004 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | on | 09/01/1958 | D2005 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | on | 09/01/1958 | D2006 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | on | 09/01/1958 | D2007 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | on | 09/01/1958 | D2008 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | on | 29/01/1958 | 65501 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | on | 04/02/1958 | 65575 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | on | 12/02/1958 | D2009 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | on | 12/02/1958 | D2010 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/02/1958 | 58214 | Transfer out to: | 15D | Bedford | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | on | 03/03/1958 | 65500 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | E4 | 2-4-0 | on | 04/03/1958 | 62788 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 08/03/1958 | 62618 | Transfer out to: | 31C | Kings Lynn | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 08/03/1958 | 68530 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 08/03/1958 | 68554 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 08/03/1958 | 69617 | Transfer out to: | 31C | Kings Lynn | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 12/03/1958 | D3611 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | E4 | 2-4-0 | on | 17/03/1958 | 62797 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | on | 18/03/1958 | D2013 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | on | 18/03/1958 | D2014 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | on | 18/03/1958 | D2015 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | on | 18/03/1958 | D2016 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/04/1958 | D2017 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/04/1958 | 11123 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/04/1958 | 65504 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/04/1958 | 65505 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/04/1958 | 65548 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | on | 05/05/1958 | 65534 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/05/1958 | 61667 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/05/1958 | D2013 | Transfer out to: | 31C | Kings Lynn | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/05/1958 | D2014 | Transfer out to: | 31C | Kings Lynn | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/05/1958 | D2015 | Transfer out to: | 31C | Kings Lynn | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/05/1958 | D2016 | Transfer out to: | 31D | South Lynn | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/05/1958 | D2017 | Transfer out to: | 31D | South Lynn | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | on | 19/05/1958 | 65442 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 08/06/1958 | 64985 | Transfer in from: | 35C | Spital Bridge | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 08/06/1958 | 64958 | Transfer out to: | 33A | Plaistow | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 62522 | Transfer in from: | 31C | Kings Lynn | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 62588 | Transfer in from: | 31C | Kings Lynn | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 65561 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 69619 | Transfer out to: | 31C | Kings Lynn | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 69620 | Transfer out to: | 31C | Kings Lynn | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | on | 23/06/1958 | 61667 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | on | 14/07/1958 | 61516 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/07/1958 | 61636 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | on | 19/07/1958 | 65438 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | on | 04/08/1958 | 62522 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 10/08/1958 | 61182 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B2 | 4-6-0 | on | 11/08/1958 | 61617 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/08/1958 | 61834 | Transfer in from: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 16/08/1958 | 69690 | Transfer out to: | 32C | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | on | 25/08/1958 | 61553 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | on | 25/08/1958 | 65562 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 28/08/1958 | 64751 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | B2 | 4-6-0 | on | 08/09/1958 | 61603 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 13/09/1958 | 62513 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 13/09/1958 | 69651 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 13/09/1958 | 69692 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 14/09/1958 | 61066 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 14/09/1958 | 61096 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | on | 15/09/1958 | 61554 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | on | 15/09/1958 | 61642 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 21/09/1958 | 61066 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 21/09/1958 | 61096 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B2 | 4-6-0 | on | 22/09/1958 | 61671 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 28/09/1958 | 64729 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | on | 02/10/1958 | D2028 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 12/10/1958 | 64890 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | on | 13/10/1958 | 62588 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | on | 16/10/1958 | D2029 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | on | 03/11/1958 | 62513 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | on | 11/11/1958 | 61567 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | on | 13/11/1958 | D2031 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 5w/e | 15/11/1958 | 62534 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 5w/e | 15/11/1958 | 62582 | Transfer in from: | KL | Kings Lynn | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 15/11/1958 | 65450 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | on | 15/11/1958 | 61640 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/12/1958 | 65587 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 06/12/1958 | D2031 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 06/12/1958 | 65565 | Transfer out to: | 31C | Kings Lynn | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 14/12/1958 | 61096 | Transfer out to: | 31F | Spital Bridge | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 14/12/1958 | 61300 | Transfer out to: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 20/12/1958 | 61608 | Transfer in from: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 20/12/1958 | 61817 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1959 | 61549 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1959 | 61573 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1959 | 61576 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1959 | 62582 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1959 | 69616 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J20 | 0-6-0 | on | 12/01/1959 | 64688 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B2 | 4-6-0 | on | 02/02/1959 | 61632 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 07/02/1959 | 68600 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 08/02/1959 | 61104 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | B2 | 4-6-0 | on | 09/02/1959 | 61615 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 14/02/1959 | 61613 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 14/02/1959 | 61651 | Transfer in from: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 14/02/1959 | 61655 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 14/02/1959 | 61661 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 14/02/1959 | 61880 | Transfer in from: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 14/02/1959 | 65528 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 14/02/1959 | 65540 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 14/02/1959 | 65556 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 14/02/1959 | 67701 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 14/02/1959 | 67712 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 14/02/1959 | 67718 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 14/02/1959 | 67720 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 14/02/1959 | 67721 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 14/02/1959 | 67722 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 14/02/1959 | 67733 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 14/02/1959 | 67734 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 28/02/1959 | 67723 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | on | 02/03/1959 | 61580 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/03/1959 | D2016 | Transfer in from: | 31D | South Lynn | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/03/1959 | D2017 | Transfer in from: | 31D | South Lynn | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 07/03/1959 | 61849 | Transfer in from: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 07/03/1959 | 68566 | Transfer in from: | SL | South Lynn | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | on | 06/04/1959 | 61575 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | on | 09/04/1959 | 61655 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 11/04/1959 | 67713 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 12/04/1959 | 61171 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 12/04/1959 | 61236 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 12/04/1959 | 61280 | Transfer in from: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 12/04/1959 | 61360 | Transfer in from: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | on | 13/04/1959 | 61558 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | on | 13/04/1959 | 65540 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 18/04/1959 | 61577 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 03/05/1959 | 61104 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | on | 11/05/1959 | 61546 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B2 | 4-6-0 | on | 18/05/1959 | 61639 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B2 | 4-6-0 | on | 08/06/1959 | 61614 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 13/06/1959 | 61530 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 13/06/1959 | 61533 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | D2029 | Transfer out to: | 34D | Hitchin (GNR) | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 68566 | Transfer out to: | 31C | Kings Lynn | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 27/06/1959 | 67733 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 04/07/1959 | 43087 | Transfer out to: | 31C | Kings Lynn | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | on | 23/07/1959 | 61661 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | on | 31/07/1959 | 61623 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | on | 14/08/1959 | 61651 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/09/1959 | 65475 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/09/1959 | 65502 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 05/09/1959 | 67701 | Transfer out to: | 32C | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | B2 | 4-6-0 | on | 07/09/1959 | 61616 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | on | 17/09/1959 | 61652 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | on | 28/09/1959 | 61577 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 28/09/1959 | 64803 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | on | 28/09/1959 | 65451 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 11/10/1959 | 61314 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 31/10/1959 | 61618 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 31/10/1959 | 61625 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 31/10/1959 | 61647 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Steam | J20 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 11/1959 | 64683 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/11/1959 | 61360 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | on | 03/11/1959 | 61533 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 68609 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | on | 09/11/1959 | 61530 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | on | 16/11/1959 | 65580 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | on | 18/11/1959 | 61647 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J20 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 21/11/1959 | 64684 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | J20 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 21/11/1959 | 64698 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | B2 | 4-6-0 | on | 25/11/1959 | 61644 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | on | 03/12/1959 | 61625 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 05/12/1959 | 65578 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Steam | E4 | 2-4-0 | on | 07/12/1959 | 62785 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 12/12/1959 | 61610 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 12/12/1959 | 61626 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 12/12/1959 | 61801 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | on | 18/12/1959 | 61613 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 31/12/1959 | 64985 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 10/01/1960 | 61252 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 10/01/1960 | 61253 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 10/01/1960 | 61254 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 10/01/1960 | 61300 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 10/01/1960 | 61363 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | on | 11/01/1960 | 61610 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | on | 11/01/1960 | 61626 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J20 | 0-6-0 | on | 12/01/1960 | 64695 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B2 | 4-6-0 | on | 14/01/1960 | 61607 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | on | 23/01/1960 | 61618 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | on | 28/01/1960 | 61641 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 06/02/1960 | D2010 | Transfer out to: | 31C | Kings Lynn | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | on | 08/02/1960 | 65477 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | on | 14/03/1960 | 61608 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 19/03/1960 | 65478 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | on | 14/04/1960 | 65461 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 12/06/1960 | 61046 | Transfer in from: | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 12/06/1960 | 61048 | Transfer in from: | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 76030 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 76032 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 76033 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J20 | 0-6-0 | on | 27/06/1960 | 64684 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 11/09/1960 | 61203 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 65513 | Transfer in from: | 31C | Kings Lynn | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 65560 | Transfer in from: | 31C | Kings Lynn | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 65582 | Transfer in from: | 31C | Kings Lynn | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 76030 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 76032 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 76033 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 12/11/1960 | D3493 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 12/11/1960 | D2016 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 12/11/1960 | 65541 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 20/11/1960 | 61046 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 20/11/1960 | 61048 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 20/11/1960 | 61066 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 20/11/1960 | 61171 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 20/11/1960 | 61182 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 20/11/1960 | 61236 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 20/11/1960 | 61252 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 20/11/1960 | 61253 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 20/11/1960 | 61254 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 20/11/1960 | 61280 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 20/11/1960 | 61283 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 03/12/1960 | 67718 | Transfer out to: | 34E | New England | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 03/12/1960 | 67721 | Transfer out to: | 34E | New England | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | on | 02/01/1961 | 65589 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 14/01/1961 | 46468 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 14/01/1961 | 46469 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 04/02/1961 | 12134 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 04/02/1961 | D3493 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | on | 22/02/1961 | 65520 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | on | 16/03/1961 | 65556 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J20 | 0-6-0 | on | 20/03/1961 | 64698 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | on | 21/03/1961 | 65513 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 25/03/1961 | 90501 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 25/03/1961 | 90522 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 25/03/1961 | 46468 | Transfer out to: | 63C | Oban | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 01/04/1961 | 46494 | Transfer in from: | 19B | Sheffield Millhouses | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 17/04/1961 | 61849 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 22/04/1961 | 90501 | Transfer out to: | 33B | Tilbury | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 22/04/1961 | 90522 | Transfer out to: | 33B | Tilbury | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 11/06/1961 | 61005 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 11/06/1961 | 61046 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 11/06/1961 | 61048 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 67720 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 67723 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 67734 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 22/07/1961 | 43086 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 22/07/1961 | 43105 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 22/07/1961 | 43149 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/07/1961 | 65560 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/07/1961 | 65578 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/07/1961 | 65582 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 65469 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | on | 04/10/1961 | 67712 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | on | 05/10/1961 | 67713 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | on | 05/10/1961 | 67722 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 07/10/1961 | 46400 | Transfer in from: | 19B | Sheffield Millhouses | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 14/10/1961 | 46467 | Transfer out to: | 91X | To Scottish Region | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 14/10/1961 | 61834 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | on | 26/10/1961 | 65450 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | on | 26/10/1961 | 65478 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | on | 14/11/1961 | 65528 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 02/12/1961 | 65582 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 02/12/1961 | 61801 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 02/12/1961 | 61817 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 02/12/1961 | 61880 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 10/02/1962 | 65581 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | on | 11/02/1962 | 65457 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | on | 11/02/1962 | 65532 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 24/04/1962 | 61046 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | on | 25/04/1962 | 65581 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 28/04/1962 | 65576 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 17/06/1962 | 61005 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 17/06/1962 | 61048 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 17/06/1962 | 61287 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 17/06/1962 | 61300 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 17/06/1962 | 61301 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 17/06/1962 | 61363 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 17/06/1962 | 61371 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 43086 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 43105 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 43149 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 46400 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 46465 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 46466 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 46469 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 46494 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 65469 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 65576 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 65582 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 15/09/1962 | D2200 | Transfer in from: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 15/09/1962 | D3608 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/09/1962 | D2200 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 23/02/1963 | D2016 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 05/10/1963 | 12136 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/11/1964 | D2028 | Transfer out to: | 34E | New England | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 04/06/1966 | 12136 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 10/09/1966 | D2017 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/10/1966 | 12134 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 25/10/1969 | D3661 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | on | 08/10/1972 | D2006 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 14/10/1972 | D3883 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 25/11/1972 | D2009 | Transfer out to: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 25/01/1976 | 08077 | Transfer in from: | DR | Doncaster | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 25/01/1976 | 08089 | Transfer in from: | SF | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 25/01/1976 | 08090 | Transfer in from: | DR | Doncaster | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 25/01/1976 | 08108 | Transfer in from: | SF | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 22/02/1976 | 08180 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | on | 10/05/1976 | 03004 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | on | 10/05/1976 | 03007 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 08/08/1976 | 08077 | To Store | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 08/08/1976 | 08180 | To Store | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 15/08/1976 | 08506 | Transfer out to: | DN | Darlington | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | on | 05/11/1976 | 03005 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 12/1976 | 08077 | Reinstated | 98S | |||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 02/1977 | 08493 | Transfer out to: | MR | March | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 09/1977 | 08240 | Reinstated | 98S | |||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 09/1977 | 08862 | Reinstated | 98S | |||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 10/1977 | 08077 | To Store | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 10/1977 | 08090 | To Store | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/12/1978 | 03008 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/12/1978 | 03016 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 21/09/1980 | 08089 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 28/09/1980 | 08862 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 02/08/1981 | 08026 | Transfer in from: | MC | March | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 09/1981 | 08889 | Transfer in from: | MR | March | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 04/07/1982 | 08026 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 04/07/1982 | 08240 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 08/07/1984 | 08108 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/11/1988 | 08716 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 14/06/1990 | 08496 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 06/03/1992 | 08889 | Condemned |