Depot: Cardiff Canton
Type | Class | Wheels | Period | Date | Number | Event | Code | Depot | Length of Stay | Notes |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | on | 19/08/1907 | 2918 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | on | 27/08/1907 | 2919 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | on | 03/09/1907 | 2920 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | on | 01/10/1907 | 2927 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | on | 10/10/1907 | 2929 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1928 | 4089 | Transfer in from: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 18/06/1929 | 5002 | Transfer in from: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 17/09/1929 | 4089 | Transfer out to: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 08/10/1929 | 4077 | Transfer in from: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 30/06/1930 | 4091 | Transfer in from: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 09/07/1930 | 5011 | Transfer in from: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 26/07/1930 | 5010 | Transfer in from: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 29/08/1930 | 5002 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 06/01/1931 | 4097 | Transfer in from: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 09/01/1931 | 4081 | Transfer in from: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 02/03/1931 | 4099 | Transfer in from: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 23/04/1931 | 4078 | Transfer in from: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 28/04/1931 | 4092 | Transfer in from: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1931 | 5010 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 26/08/1931 | 5001 | Transfer in from: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 16/09/1931 | 4091 | Transfer out to: | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 20/09/1931 | 5001 | Transfer out to: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 20/11/1931 | 4075 | Transfer in from: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 08/01/1932 | 4081 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | on | 04/02/1932 | 2919 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 09/03/1932 | 5008 | Transfer in from: | CARM | Carmarthen | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 18/04/1932 | 4099 | Transfer out to: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 05/06/1932 | 4083 | Transfer in from: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 09/07/1932 | 5015 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 10/07/1932 | 4077 | Transfer out to: | CARM | Carmarthen | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 29/07/1932 | 4087 | Transfer in from: | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 17/09/1932 | 4075 | Transfer out to: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 09/11/1932 | 5017 | Transfer in from: | TN | Taunton | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 17/12/1932 | 4078 | Transfer out to: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 01/1933 | 5012 | Transfer in from: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 01/1933 | 5011 | Transfer out to: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 03/1933 | 4084 | Transfer in from: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 04/1933 | 4081 | Transfer in from: | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 05/1933 | 4009 | Transfer in from: | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 06/1933 | 5008 | Transfer out to: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 07/1933 | 4099 | Transfer in from: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 07/1933 | 4083 | Transfer out to: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 07/1933 | 4087 | Transfer out to: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 07/1933 | 4097 | Transfer out to: | SRD | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 11/1933 | 5017 | Transfer out to: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 12/1933 | 4093 | Transfer in from: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/01/1934 | 4092 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 28/01/1934 | 5002 | Transfer in from: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 18/02/1934 | 5020 | Transfer in from: | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 04/03/1934 | 4073 | Transfer in from: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 04/04/1934 | 5004 | Transfer in from: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 19/04/1934 | 4084 | Transfer out to: | CARM | Carmarthen | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 20/04/1934 | 4009 | Transfer out to: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 24/04/1934 | 5010 | Transfer in from: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 12/05/1934 | 4081 | Transfer out to: | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 09/06/1934 | 5003 | Transfer in from: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 16/06/1934 | 4099 | Transfer out to: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 05/07/1934 | 5015 | Transfer out to: | EXE | Exeter | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 02/10/1934 | 4073 | Transfer out to: | LDR | Landore | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 03/10/1934 | 4091 | Transfer in from: | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | m/e | 02/1935 | 2918 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 26/02/1935 | 4086 | Transfer in from: | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 27/03/1935 | 5020 | Transfer out to: | LDR | Landore | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 29/05/1935 | 5035 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 04/06/1935 | 5036 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | on | 15/10/1935 | 7222 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | 2416 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | 4278 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | 5628 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | 8366 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 13/12/1935 | 5001 | Transfer in from: | SRD | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 14/12/1935 | 1235 | Transfer in from: | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/12/1935 | 2484 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 14/12/1935 | 4079 | Transfer in from: | SRD | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 14/12/1935 | 5010 | Transfer out to: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 14/12/1935 | 5035 | Transfer out to: | SRD | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 21/12/1935 | 5004 | Transfer out to: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 31/12/1935 | 5010 | Transfer in from: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 01/1936 | 5036 | Transfer out to: | SRD | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/01/1936 | 2479 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/01/1936 | 2906 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/01/1936 | 2484 | Transfer out to: | ABDR | Aberdare | ||
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | 2983 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 08/02/1936 | 4083 | Transfer in from: | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | 4241 | Transfer in from: | LTS | Llantrisant | ||
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | 6416 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | 8378 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 02/03/1936 | 4093 | Transfer out to: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/03/1936 | 2433 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 07/03/1936 | 2876 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/03/1936 | 5398 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 07/03/1936 | 6651 | Transfer in from: | TDU | Tondu | ||
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 07/03/1936 | 6416 | Transfer out to: | LTS | Llantrisant | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 13/03/1936 | 5003 | Transfer out to: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 08/04/1936 | 5046 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 22/04/1936 | 5023 | Transfer in from: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 14/05/1936 | 5030 | Transfer in from: | EXE | Exeter | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 02/06/1936 | 4086 | Transfer out to: | WOS | Worcester | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 07/01/1937 | 4089 | Transfer in from: | LDR | Landore | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 17/02/1937 | 4089 | Transfer out to: | LDR | Landore | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 05/1937 | 4079 | Transfer out to: | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 06/1937 | 4079 | Transfer in from: | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 29/08/1937 | 4074 | Transfer in from: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 07/11/1937 | 4094 | Transfer in from: | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 18/11/1937 | 5023 | Transfer out to: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/12/1937 | 5001 | Transfer out to: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 01/04/1938 | 5054 | Transfer in from: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 07/1938 | 4091 | Transfer out to: | LDR | Landore | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 08/1938 | 5010 | Transfer out to: | LDR | Landore | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 10/1938 | 4091 | Transfer in from: | LDR | Landore | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 10/1938 | 5010 | Transfer in from: | LDR | Landore | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | m/e | 03/1939 | 8366 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 13/06/1939 | 5002 | Transfer out to: | LDR | Landore | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 26/06/1939 | 5020 | Transfer in from: | LDR | Landore | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 03/08/1939 | 5065 | Transfer in from: | EXE | Exeter | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 13/08/1939 | 5049 | Transfer in from: | WOS | Worcester | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 17/08/1939 | 5001 | Transfer in from: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 25/08/1939 | 5012 | Transfer out to: | EXE | Exeter | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 19/09/1939 | 4091 | Transfer out to: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 01/11/1939 | 4079 | Transfer out to: | ||||
Steam | 1854 | 0-6-0PT | on | 11/11/1939 | 1889 | Reinstated | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 30/03/1940 | 5007 | Transfer in from: | SDN | Swindon | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 08/04/1940 | 4074 | Transfer out to: | LDR | Landore | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 26/04/1940 | 5010 | Transfer out to: | SRD | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 08/1940 | 5080 | Transfer in from: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 08/1940 | 5093 | Transfer in from: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | on | 10/1940 | 135 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | on | 10/1940 | 169 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 13/11/1940 | 5079 | Transfer in from: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 12/1940 | 5010 | Transfer in from: | SRD | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | on | 12/1940 | 93 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 09/01/1941 | 5080 | Transfer out to: | SDN | Swindon | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 02/1941 | 5093 | Transfer out to: | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 03/1941 | 5030 | Transfer out to: | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 03/1941 | 5079 | Transfer out to: | LDR | Landore | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 20/03/1941 | 5080 | Transfer in from: | SDN | Swindon | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 06/09/1941 | 4083 | To Store | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 09/09/1941 | 4083 | Reinstated | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 12/01/1942 | 4094 | To Store | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 08/1942 | 5030 | Transfer in from: | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 07/11/1942 | 4094 | Reinstated | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 20/01/1943 | 5010 | Transfer out to: | SDN | Swindon | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 04/1943 | 5010 | Transfer in from: | SDN | Swindon | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 09/09/1943 | 5046 | Transfer out to: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 24/10/1943 | 5046 | Transfer in from: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 22/12/1944 | 5065 | Transfer out to: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 21/12/1945 | 5005 | Transfer in from: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 29/12/1945 | 3812 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 26/01/1946 | 2830 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 26/01/1946 | 5200 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | m/e | 03/1946 | 2983 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 8w/e | 23/03/1946 | 4200 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 8w/e | 23/03/1946 | 4236 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 20/04/1946 | 3716 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 18/05/1946 | 5183 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 25/05/1946 | 9648 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 31/05/1946 | 7001 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 1854 | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 1889 | Snapshot | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 1854 | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 1889 | Snapshot | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 1854 | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 1891 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | O4 | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 200 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | O4 | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 209 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | B1 | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 238 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 2484 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 2537 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 2538 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 2570 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Aberdare | 2-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 2667 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 2820 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 2821 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 2830 | Snapshot | OXY | Oxley | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 2837 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 2860 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 2864 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 2876 | Snapshot | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 2877 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 2889 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 2890 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 2891 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 2905 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 2906 | Snapshot | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 2906 | Snapshot | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 2920 | Snapshot | HFD | Hereford | ||
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 2927 | Snapshot | SDN | Swindon | ||
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 2929 | Snapshot | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 2936 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 2940 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 2943 | Snapshot | brd | Weston-super-Mare | ||
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 2952 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | O4 | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 310 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | O4 | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 313 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | O4 | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 317 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 335 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 357 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 3708 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 3716 | Snapshot | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 3716 | Snapshot | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 3755 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 3809 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 381 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 3812 | Snapshot | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 3812 | Snapshot | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 3813 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 3814 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 3817 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 3823 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 3824 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 4083 | Snapshot | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 4083 | Snapshot | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 4094 | Snapshot | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 4094 | Snapshot | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | O3 | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 410 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | O3 | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 411 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | O4 | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 420 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | on | 15/06/1947 | 4200 | Snapshot | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | on | 15/06/1947 | 4200 | Snapshot | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | on | 15/06/1947 | 4227 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | on | 15/06/1947 | 4236 | Snapshot | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | on | 15/06/1947 | 4236 | Snapshot | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | on | 15/06/1947 | 4241 | Snapshot | TDU | Tondu | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | on | 15/06/1947 | 4278 | Snapshot | LLY | Llanelli | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | on | 15/06/1947 | 4290 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 4622 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 4633 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 4637 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 4652 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 4677 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 4901 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 4913 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 4952 | Snapshot | HFD | Hereford | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 4953 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 4974 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 4975 | Snapshot | rdg | Basingstoke (GWR) | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5001 | Snapshot | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5001 | Snapshot | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5005 | Snapshot | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5005 | Snapshot | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5007 | Snapshot | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5007 | Snapshot | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5010 | Snapshot | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5010 | Snapshot | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5020 | Snapshot | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5020 | Snapshot | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5030 | Snapshot | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5030 | Snapshot | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5046 | Snapshot | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5046 | Snapshot | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5049 | Snapshot | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5049 | Snapshot | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5052 | Snapshot | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5054 | Snapshot | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5054 | Snapshot | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5080 | Snapshot | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5080 | Snapshot | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 5183 | Snapshot | STJ | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | on | 15/06/1947 | 5200 | Snapshot | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | on | 15/06/1947 | 5200 | Snapshot | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | on | 15/06/1947 | 5205 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | on | 15/06/1947 | 5236 | Snapshot | ABEEG | Aberbeeg | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | on | 15/06/1947 | 5249 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | on | 15/06/1947 | 5262 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5307 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5335 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5378 | Snapshot | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5378 | Snapshot | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5382 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5388 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5398 | Snapshot | GLO | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 5628 | Snapshot | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 5628 | Snapshot | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 5679 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 5685 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 5749 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5910 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5946 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5958 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5970 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5977 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 6343 | Snapshot | tn | Barnstaple | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 6353 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 6394 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 6622 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 6651 | Snapshot | PPRD | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 6691 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 6805 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 6810 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 6811 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 6817 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 6827 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 6928 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 6946 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 6948 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 6969 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 7001 | Snapshot | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 7001 | Snapshot | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 7201 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 7219 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 7222 | Snapshot | OXY | Oxley | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 77053 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 77380 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 8464 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 8728 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 8740 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 9629 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 9648 | Snapshot | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 9648 | Snapshot | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 9713 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 9759 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 9796 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8464 | Snapshot | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 24/01/1948 | 5776 | Transfer in from: | PILL | Newport Pill | ||
Steam | O3 | 0-6-2T | m/e | 02/1948 | 411 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 21/02/1948 | 3729 | Transfer in from: | ABEEG | Aberbeeg | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 21/02/1948 | 4637 | Transfer out to: | ABEEG | Aberbeeg | ||
Steam | O3 | 0-6-2T | m/e | 03/1948 | 410 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | m/e | 31/03/1948 | 4222 | Transfer in from: | ABEEG | Aberbeeg | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | m/e | 31/03/1948 | 5236 | Transfer out to: | ABEEG | Aberbeeg | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 09/04/1948 | 7001 | Transfer out to: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | m/e | 30/04/1948 | 2905 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 05/1948 | 5099 | Transfer in from: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 31/05/1948 | 4686 | Transfer in from: | ABEEG | Aberbeeg | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 31/05/1948 | 5099 | Transfer in from: | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 31/05/1948 | 5099 | Transfer out to: | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | m/e | 31/05/1948 | 6622 | Transfer out to: | ABDR | Aberdare | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 06/1948 | 7006 | Transfer in from: | SALOP | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | B1 | 0-6-2T | m/e | 06/1948 | 238 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 11/06/1948 | 5010 | Transfer out to: | LDR | Landore | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | m/e | 30/06/1948 | 4223 | Transfer in from: | CARM | Carmarthen | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | m/e | 30/06/1948 | 4255 | Transfer in from: | DYD | Duffryn Yard | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | m/e | 30/06/1948 | 4266 | Transfer in from: | CARM | Carmarthen | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | m/e | 30/06/1948 | 4285 | Transfer in from: | ABDR | Aberdare | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | m/e | 30/06/1948 | 5207 | Transfer in from: | CARM | Carmarthen | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | m/e | 30/06/1948 | 5226 | Transfer in from: | LLY | Llanelli | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 30/06/1948 | 7006 | Transfer in from: | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | m/e | 30/06/1948 | 6805 | Transfer out to: | PPRD | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | m/e | 30/06/1948 | 6810 | Transfer out to: | PPRD | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | m/e | 30/06/1948 | 6811 | Transfer out to: | SPM | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | m/e | 30/06/1948 | 6827 | Transfer out to: | SPM | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 30/06/1948 | 7006 | Transfer out to: | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 07/1948 | 5006 | Transfer in from: | LDR | Landore | ||
Steam | O4 | 0-6-2T | m/e | 07/1948 | 200 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/07/1948 | 5006 | Transfer in from: | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 10/07/1948 | 78632 | Transfer in from: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 10/07/1948 | 8723 | Transfer in from: | ABEEG | Aberbeeg | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 10/07/1948 | 3729 | Transfer out to: | ABEEG | Aberbeeg | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/07/1948 | 5006 | Transfer out to: | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/07/1948 | 6817 | Transfer out to: | TN | Taunton | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 10/07/1948 | 77053 | Transfer out to: | PPRD | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 10/07/1948 | 77380 | Transfer out to: | PPRD | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 07/08/1948 | 5786 | Transfer in from: | ABEEG | Aberbeeg | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 07/08/1948 | 4686 | Transfer out to: | ABEEG | Aberbeeg | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 07/08/1948 | 5628 | Transfer out to: | PPRD | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 25/08/1948 | 7006 | Transfer out to: | GLO | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 09/1948 | 7016 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/09/1948 | 2484 | Transfer out to: | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 30/09/1948 | 7004 | Transfer in from: | GLO | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | on | 14/10/1948 | 7214 | Transfer in from: | DID | Didcot | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 14/10/1948 | 78543 | Transfer in from: | PPRD | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | Aberdare | 2-6-0 | on | 14/10/1948 | 2667 | Transfer out to: | PPRD | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | on | 14/10/1948 | 2890 | Transfer out to: | CHR | Chester West | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 30/10/1948 | 4145 | Transfer in from: | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/10/1948 | 7004 | Transfer in from: | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/10/1948 | 7004 | Transfer out to: | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 30/10/1948 | 78543 | Transfer out to: | PPRD | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 27/11/1948 | 4238 | Transfer in from: | PPRD | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 27/11/1948 | 9723 | Transfer in from: | ABEEG | Aberbeeg | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 27/11/1948 | 2864 | Transfer out to: | PPRD | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 27/11/1948 | 2889 | Transfer out to: | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 27/11/1948 | 3716 | Transfer out to: | ABEEG | Aberbeeg | ||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 4w/e | 27/11/1948 | 7214 | Transfer out to: | TDU | Tondu | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 12/1948 | 7017 | Transfer in from: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 1854 | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 12/1948 | 1889 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 25/12/1948 | 4275 | Transfer in from: | PPRD | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 01/1949 | 7004 | Transfer out to: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | m/e | 01/1949 | 2570 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/01/1949 | 7017 | Transfer in from: | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/01/1949 | 7017 | Transfer out to: | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 26/02/1949 | 4287 | Transfer in from: | ABEEG | Aberbeeg | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 26/02/1949 | 4238 | Transfer out to: | ABEEG | Aberbeeg | ||
Steam | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/03/1949 | 2407 | Transfer in from: | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 14/04/1949 | 5089 | Transfer in from: | SDN | Swindon | ||
Steam | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/04/1949 | 2538 | Transfer out to: | CNYD | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 23/04/1949 | 5200 | Transfer out to: | PILL | Newport Pill | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 21/05/1949 | 4222 | Transfer out to: | ABEEG | Aberbeeg | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 21/05/1949 | 4236 | Transfer out to: | TDU | Tondu | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 06/1949 | 7020 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/06/1949 | 5089 | Transfer in from: | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 18/06/1949 | 3813 | Transfer out to: | BAN | Banbury | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/06/1949 | 5089 | Transfer out to: | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 07/1949 | 7022 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 07/1949 | 7023 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 16/07/1949 | 3670 | Transfer in from: | ABEEG | Aberbeeg | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/07/1949 | 6939 | Transfer in from: | OXY | Oxley | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 16/07/1949 | 3708 | Transfer out to: | ABEEG | Aberbeeg | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 13/08/1949 | 5307 | Transfer out to: | TN | Taunton | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 13/08/1949 | 6691 | Transfer out to: | DYD | Duffryn Yard | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 16/08/1949 | 5080 | Transfer out to: | SDN | Swindon | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 10/09/1949 | 4270 | Transfer in from: | ABEEG | Aberbeeg | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 10/09/1949 | 4290 | Transfer out to: | ABEEG | Aberbeeg | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 13/09/1949 | 5080 | Transfer in from: | SDN | Swindon | ||
Steam | Achilles | 4-2-2 | 4w/e | 08/10/1949 | 3036 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1949 | 5335 | Transfer out to: | LLY | Llanelli | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 05/11/1949 | 4231 | Transfer in from: | ABEEG | Aberbeeg | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 05/11/1949 | 4223 | Transfer out to: | ABEEG | Aberbeeg | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/11/1949 | 5378 | Transfer out to: | LLY | Llanelli | ||
Steam | 1854 | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 12/1949 | 1891 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/12/1949 | 5307 | Transfer in from: | TN | Taunton | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 31/12/1949 | 5207 | Transfer out to: | ABEEG | Aberbeeg | ||
Steam | Unclassified | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 28/01/1950 | 425 | Transfer in from: | PILL | Newport Pill | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 28/01/1950 | 4267 | Transfer in from: | ABEEG | Aberbeeg | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 21/02/1950 | 4083 | To Store | ||||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 25/03/1950 | 4224 | Transfer in from: | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/03/1950 | 6943 | Transfer in from: | HFD | Hereford | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 25/03/1950 | 2821 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 17/06/1950 | 4222 | Transfer in from: | ABEEG | Aberbeeg | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 17/06/1950 | 2860 | Transfer out to: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 17/06/1950 | 4267 | Transfer out to: | 86H | Aberbeeg | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 17/06/1950 | 8740 | Transfer out to: | 86F | Tondu | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 15/07/1950 | 3729 | Transfer in from: | ABEEG | Aberbeeg | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 15/07/1950 | 9796 | Transfer out to: | 86H | Aberbeeg | ||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 7210 | Transfer in from: | STJ | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 7232 | Transfer in from: | STJ | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 4w/e | 30/09/1950 | 7210 | Transfer in from: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 4w/e | 30/09/1950 | 7232 | Transfer in from: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 4w/e | 30/09/1950 | 7210 | Transfer out to: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 4w/e | 30/09/1950 | 7232 | Transfer out to: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/10/1950 | 5307 | Transfer out to: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 06/11/1950 | 5077 | Transfer in from: | TN | Taunton | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 2806 | Transfer in from: | ABDR | Aberdare | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 2892 | Transfer in from: | STJ | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 4963 | Transfer in from: | WES | Westbury | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 4968 | Transfer in from: | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 5077 | Transfer in from: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 5911 | Transfer in from: | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 6837 | Transfer in from: | SPM | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 5077 | Transfer out to: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 08/12/1950 | 7016 | Transfer out to: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/12/1950 | 7016 | Transfer in from: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 2806 | Transfer in from: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 2892 | Transfer in from: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | w/e | 31/12/1950 | 4268 | Transfer in from: | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 4963 | Transfer in from: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 4968 | Transfer in from: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 5911 | Transfer in from: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 6837 | Transfer in from: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 2806 | Transfer out to: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 2892 | Transfer out to: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 4963 | Transfer out to: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 4968 | Transfer out to: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 5911 | Transfer out to: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 6837 | Transfer out to: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | m/e | 01/1951 | 2943 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Unclassified | 0-6-2T | m/e | 01/1951 | 425 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 31/01/1951 | 4130 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 31/01/1951 | 4268 | Transfer in from: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 2407 | Transfer out to: | 89A | Oswestry | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 31/01/1951 | 4268 | Transfer out to: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 4223 | Transfer in from: | ABEEG | Aberbeeg | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 5925 | Transfer in from: | WES | Westbury | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 6603 | Transfer in from: | RYR | Radyr | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 6607 | Transfer in from: | RYR | Radyr | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 6653 | Transfer in from: | CV.BRY | Barry | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 90188 | Transfer in from: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 28/02/1951 | 4130 | Transfer out to: | 86B | Newport Pill | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 4275 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 4287 | Transfer out to: | 86H | Aberbeeg | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 5911 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 31/03/1951 | 4223 | Transfer in from: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/03/1951 | 5925 | Transfer in from: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 31/03/1951 | 6603 | Transfer in from: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 31/03/1951 | 6607 | Transfer in from: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 31/03/1951 | 6653 | Transfer in from: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 31/03/1951 | 90188 | Transfer in from: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 31/03/1951 | 4223 | Transfer out to: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/03/1951 | 5925 | Transfer out to: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 31/03/1951 | 6603 | Transfer out to: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 31/03/1951 | 6607 | Transfer out to: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 31/03/1951 | 6653 | Transfer out to: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 31/03/1951 | 90188 | Transfer out to: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | O4 | 0-6-2T | m/e | 04/1951 | 220 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | m/e | 04/1951 | 2936 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Unclassified | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 1205 | Transfer in from: | PILL | Newport Pill | ||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 349 | Transfer in from: | PPRD | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 3842 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 6600 | Transfer in from: | OXY | Oxley | ||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 7216 | Transfer in from: | STJ | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 6653 | Transfer out to: | 86G | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/04/1951 | 5911 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | Unclassified | 2-6-2T | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 1205 | Transfer in from: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 349 | Transfer in from: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 3842 | Transfer in from: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 5633 | Transfer in from: | TDU | Tondu | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 6600 | Transfer in from: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 6602 | Transfer in from: | CV.BRY | Barry | ||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 7216 | Transfer in from: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Unclassified | 2-6-2T | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 1205 | Transfer out to: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 349 | Transfer out to: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 3842 | Transfer out to: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 6600 | Transfer out to: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 7216 | Transfer out to: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 90188 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 14/07/1951 | 4267 | Transfer in from: | 86H | Aberbeeg | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 14/07/1951 | 4222 | Transfer out to: | 86H | Aberbeeg | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 14/07/1951 | 4227 | Transfer out to: | 86H | Aberbeeg | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 14/07/1951 | 6602 | Transfer out to: | 88C | Barry | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 14/07/1951 | 6603 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | m/e | 31/07/1951 | 4267 | Transfer in from: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | m/e | 31/07/1951 | 4267 | Transfer out to: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 6333 | Transfer in from: | PPRD | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 90188 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 90630 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 90701 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 6607 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/08/1951 | 6333 | Transfer in from: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 31/08/1951 | 90188 | Transfer in from: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 31/08/1951 | 90630 | Transfer in from: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 31/08/1951 | 90701 | Transfer in from: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/08/1951 | 6333 | Transfer out to: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 31/08/1951 | 90188 | Transfer out to: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 31/08/1951 | 90630 | Transfer out to: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 31/08/1951 | 90701 | Transfer out to: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | m/e | 09/1951 | 2952 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 7201 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 31/10/1951 | 90238 | Transfer in from: | SPM | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 31/10/1951 | 90701 | Transfer in from: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 31/10/1951 | 90701 | Transfer out to: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | O4 | 0-6-2T | 8w/e | 03/11/1951 | 282 | Transfer in from: | ABDR | Aberdare | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 8w/e | 03/11/1951 | 4303 | Transfer in from: | PPRD | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 8w/e | 03/11/1951 | 6621 | Transfer in from: | 86F | Tondu | ||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 8w/e | 03/11/1951 | 357 | Transfer out to: | 86J | Aberdare | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 01/12/1951 | 4145 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 371 | Transfer in from: | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 9459 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 9460 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | O4 | 0-6-2T | m/e | 01/1952 | 203 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | m/e | 01/1952 | 2940 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 4952 | Transfer out to: | 83F | Truro | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 4968 | Transfer out to: | 83G | Penzance | ||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 31/01/1952 | 371 | Transfer in from: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 31/01/1952 | 9459 | Transfer in from: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 31/01/1952 | 9460 | Transfer in from: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 31/01/1952 | 371 | Transfer out to: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 31/01/1952 | 9459 | Transfer out to: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 31/01/1952 | 9460 | Transfer out to: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 4952 | Transfer in from: | 83F | Truro | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 4968 | Transfer in from: | 83G | Penzance | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 9459 | Transfer out to: | 86H | Aberbeeg | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/02/1952 | 4952 | Transfer out to: | 83F | Truro | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/02/1952 | 4968 | Transfer out to: | 83G | Penzance | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 8776 | Transfer in from: | ABEEG | Aberbeeg | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 9460 | Transfer out to: | 86H | Aberbeeg | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/03/1952 | 4952 | Transfer in from: | 83F | Truro | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/03/1952 | 4968 | Transfer in from: | 83G | Penzance | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 3803 | Transfer in from: | SHL | Southall | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 4318 | Transfer in from: | DID | Didcot | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 6602 | Transfer in from: | 88C | Barry | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 4267 | Transfer out to: | 88C | Barry | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 4952 | Transfer out to: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 7216 | Transfer out to: | 86J | Aberdare | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 30/04/1952 | 8776 | Transfer in from: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 30/04/1952 | 8776 | Transfer out to: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 2826 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 2835 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 2868 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 3803 | Transfer in from: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 4318 | Transfer in from: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 6370 | Transfer in from: | PPRD | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 6602 | Transfer in from: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 77102 | Transfer in from: | OXY | Oxley | ||
Steam | Achilles | 4-2-2 | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 3036 | Transfer out to: | 86G | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 3803 | Transfer out to: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 4266 | Transfer out to: | 86J | Aberdare | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 4318 | Transfer out to: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 6602 | Transfer out to: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 7210 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 7232 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | m/e | 06/1952 | 4318 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 6654 | Transfer in from: | 86J | Aberdare | ||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 371 | Transfer out to: | 86J | Aberdare | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6w/e | 30/06/1952 | 6654 | Transfer in from: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6w/e | 30/06/1952 | 6654 | Transfer out to: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 2w/e | 12/07/1952 | 5913 | Transfer in from: | LDR | Landore | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 2w/e | 12/07/1952 | 5916 | Transfer in from: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 2w/e | 12/07/1952 | 90192 | Transfer in from: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 2w/e | 12/07/1952 | 90572 | Transfer in from: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2w/e | 12/07/1952 | 2826 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2w/e | 12/07/1952 | 2835 | Transfer out to: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2w/e | 12/07/1952 | 2868 | Transfer out to: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 2w/e | 12/07/1952 | 5226 | Transfer out to: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | O4 | 0-6-2T | m/e | 08/1952 | 209 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | m/e | 08/1952 | 2906 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 5916 | Transfer out to: | 86G | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 6370 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 12/08/1952 | 5077 | Transfer out to: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 22/09/1952 | 5077 | Transfer in from: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 10/1952 | 5018 | Transfer in from: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 10/1952 | 5090 | Transfer in from: | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 10/1952 | 5018 | Transfer out to: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | on | 07/10/1952 | 70026 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | on | 24/10/1952 | 70027 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | on | 27/10/1952 | 70028 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 11/1952 | 5012 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 11/1952 | 5090 | Transfer out to: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | m/e | 11/1952 | 4303 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 2945 | Transfer in from: | SDN | Swindon | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 5012 | Transfer in from: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 5018 | Transfer in from: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 5090 | Transfer in from: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 70026 | Transfer in from: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 70027 | Transfer in from: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 70028 | Transfer in from: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 7208 | Transfer in from: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 5012 | Transfer out to: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 6654 | Transfer out to: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 6837 | Transfer out to: | 86G | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 70026 | Transfer out to: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 70027 | Transfer out to: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 70028 | Transfer out to: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | on | 08/11/1952 | 70029 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 371 | Transfer in from: | 86J | Aberdare | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 70029 | Transfer in from: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | O4 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 208 | Transfer out to: | 86J | Aberdare | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 70029 | Transfer out to: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 12/1952 | 5012 | Transfer out to: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 09/12/1952 | 4094 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 4223 | Transfer out to: | 87F | Llanelli | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 5018 | Transfer out to: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 5090 | Transfer out to: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 5249 | Transfer out to: | 87F | Llanelli | ||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 7208 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | m/e | 01/1953 | 2537 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 374 | Transfer in from: | ABDR | Aberdare | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 4207 | Transfer in from: | 87B | Duffryn Yard | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 4250 | Transfer in from: | 87B | Duffryn Yard | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 90524 | Transfer in from: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | O4 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 282 | Transfer out to: | 86J | Aberdare | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 90701 | Transfer out to: | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 3846 | Transfer in from: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 4226 | Transfer in from: | PILL | Newport Pill | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 4266 | Transfer in from: | 86J | Aberdare | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 70025 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 4285 | Transfer out to: | 86B | Newport Pill | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 5958 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | m/e | 06/1953 | 2945 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 30/06/1953 | 8439 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 4946 | Transfer in from: | PZ | Penzance | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 5913 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 9629 | Transfer out to: | 83C | Exeter | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/08/1953 | 6951 | Transfer in from: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 05/09/1953 | 4225 | Transfer in from: | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/09/1953 | 6932 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 05/09/1953 | 4224 | Transfer out to: | 88C | Barry | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 75005 | Transfer in from: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 75006 | Transfer in from: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 75007 | Transfer in from: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 75009 | Transfer in from: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 75008 | Transfer in from: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 4975 | Transfer out to: | 85C | Hereford | ||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 7219 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 25/11/1953 | 335 | Transfer out to: | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/11/1953 | 6394 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 26/12/1953 | 5207 | Transfer in from: | ABEEG | Aberbeeg | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/12/1953 | 4963 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/12/1953 | 75006 | Transfer out to: | 89A | Oswestry | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/01/1954 | 4951 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 30/01/1954 | 5620 | Transfer in from: | 86G | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 30/01/1954 | 4268 | Transfer out to: | 86D | Llantrisant | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 27/02/1954 | 5218 | Transfer in from: | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 27/02/1954 | 4255 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/02/1954 | 4951 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/02/1954 | 75005 | Transfer out to: | 89A | Oswestry | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/03/1954 | 5334 | Transfer in from: | 86G | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 27/03/1954 | 5602 | Transfer in from: | 86H | Aberbeeg | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 27/03/1954 | 8402 | Transfer in from: | ABEEG | Aberbeeg | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 27/03/1954 | 6621 | Transfer out to: | 86H | Aberbeeg | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 27/03/1954 | 8439 | Transfer out to: | 86H | Aberbeeg | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 27/03/1954 | 9723 | Transfer out to: | 86G | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 04/1954 | 5089 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 90148 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 9723 | Transfer in from: | 86G | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 2820 | Transfer out to: | 81E | Didcot | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/05/1954 | 4934 | Transfer in from: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 22/05/1954 | 2806 | Transfer out to: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 06/1954 | 9493 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 06/1954 | 5006 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1954 | 5077 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/06/1954 | 9304 | Transfer in from: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 19/06/1954 | 3823 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/06/1954 | 4901 | Transfer out to: | 86G | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | O4 | 0-6-2T | m/e | 07/1954 | 205 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 02/07/1954 | 5074 | Reinstated | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 09/07/1954 | 7017 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 3652 | Transfer in from: | 86F | Tondu | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 4662 | Transfer in from: | 86F | Tondu | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 5202 | Transfer in from: | 86H | Aberbeeg | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 6352 | Transfer in from: | HFD | Hereford | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 73025 | Transfer in from: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 73026 | Transfer in from: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 9300 | Transfer in from: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 9459 | Transfer in from: | 86H | Aberbeeg | ||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 349 | Transfer out to: | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 371 | Transfer out to: | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 374 | Transfer out to: | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 381 | Transfer out to: | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 4250 | Transfer out to: | 86H | Aberbeeg | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/08/1954 | 5923 | Transfer in from: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 14/08/1954 | 9461 | Transfer in from: | 87B | Duffryn Yard | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 2805 | Transfer in from: | 86B | Newport Pill | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 2873 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 2896 | Transfer in from: | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 3801 | Transfer in from: | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 3810 | Transfer in from: | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 3816 | Transfer in from: | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 3836 | Transfer in from: | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 90693 | Transfer in from: | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 3824 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 5382 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 90192 | Transfer out to: | 86G | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 90125 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 9603 | Transfer in from: | FGD | Fishguard Goodwick | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 4677 | Transfer out to: | 87J | Fishguard Goodwick | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 5794 | Transfer in from: | STB | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 3729 | Transfer out to: | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 01/01/1955 | 4254 | Transfer in from: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 7201 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 8w/e | 26/03/1955 | 6663 | Transfer in from: | 86H | Aberbeeg | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 8w/e | 26/03/1955 | 90201 | Transfer in from: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 8w/e | 26/03/1955 | 2896 | Transfer out to: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 8w/e | 26/03/1955 | 3812 | Transfer out to: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 8w/e | 26/03/1955 | 3836 | Transfer out to: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 8w/e | 26/03/1955 | 7201 | Transfer out to: | 86G | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 23/04/1955 | 5685 | Transfer out to: | 86H | Aberbeeg | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/05/1955 | 5910 | Transfer out to: | 82D | Westbury | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 07/1955 | 5074 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/07/1955 | 75004 | Transfer in from: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 16/07/1955 | 3814 | Transfer out to: | 81E | Didcot | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/07/1955 | 6951 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 13/08/1955 | 73014 | Transfer in from: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 13/08/1955 | 90579 | Transfer in from: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/09/1955 | 5362 | Transfer in from: | 83C | Exeter | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 10/09/1955 | 6621 | Transfer in from: | 86H | Aberbeeg | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 10/09/1955 | 5205 | Transfer out to: | 86B | Newport Pill | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 10/09/1955 | 6663 | Transfer out to: | 86H | Aberbeeg | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 6308 | Transfer in from: | 85C | Hereford | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 90323 | Transfer in from: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 90355 | Transfer in from: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 5202 | Transfer out to: | 86B | Newport Pill | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 5388 | Transfer out to: | 86G | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 5620 | Transfer out to: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 5794 | Transfer out to: | 86H | Aberbeeg | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 5977 | Transfer out to: | 85C | Hereford | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 6602 | Transfer out to: | 87B | Duffryn Yard | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 9304 | Transfer out to: | 85C | Hereford | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/11/1955 | 4901 | Transfer in from: | 86G | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 05/11/1955 | 7775 | Transfer in from: | ABEEG | Aberbeeg | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 23/11/1955 | 5039 | Transfer in from: | 87G | Carmarthen | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 12/1955 | 5072 | Transfer in from: | LDR | Landore | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 12/1955 | 5039 | Transfer out to: | 87G | Carmarthen | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 12/1955 | 5080 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 4964 | Transfer in from: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Unclassified | 2-6-2T | m/e | 01/1956 | 1205 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 25/02/1956 | 6644 | Transfer in from: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 25/02/1956 | 3652 | Transfer out to: | 86B | Newport Pill | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 25/02/1956 | 4200 | Transfer out to: | 86H | Aberbeeg | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 2874 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 4973 | Transfer in from: | SDN | Swindon | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 4996 | Transfer in from: | GLO | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 5969 | Transfer in from: | 83G | Penzance | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 9459 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 9459 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 4953 | Transfer out to: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 5969 | Transfer out to: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | 15xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 1508 | Transfer in from: | STJ | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 73017 | Transfer in from: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 9426 | Transfer in from: | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 4662 | Transfer out to: | 86D | Llantrisant | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 5262 | Transfer out to: | 87D | Swansea East Dock | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 90355 | Transfer out to: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 90630 | Transfer out to: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 90633 | Transfer out to: | 25C | Goole | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 05/07/1956 | 5074 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 14/07/1956 | 3843 | Transfer in from: | STJ | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/07/1956 | 73024 | Transfer in from: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 14/07/1956 | 2873 | Transfer out to: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/07/1956 | 73017 | Transfer out to: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 9306 | Transfer in from: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 9494 | Transfer in from: | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 8402 | Transfer out to: | 21C | Bromsgrove | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 20/09/1956 | 7016 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 2821 | Transfer in from: | 86G | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 90312 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 5362 | Transfer out to: | 86G | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 08/11/1956 | 7020 | Transfer out to: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 20/11/1956 | 5099 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 12/1956 | 5005 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 12/1956 | 5049 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 12/1956 | 5074 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 29/12/1956 | 70015 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 29/12/1956 | 70016 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 29/12/1956 | 70017 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 29/12/1956 | 70018 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 29/12/1956 | 70019 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 29/12/1956 | 70020 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 29/12/1956 | 70022 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 29/12/1956 | 70024 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/01/1957 | 5052 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 18/01/1957 | 5095 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 23/01/1957 | 4073 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 24/01/1957 | 5072 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 26/01/1957 | 3845 | Transfer in from: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 26/01/1957 | 3854 | Transfer in from: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 26/01/1957 | 3860 | Transfer in from: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 26/01/1957 | 70021 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/01/1957 | 4901 | Transfer out to: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/01/1957 | 4913 | Transfer out to: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 26/01/1957 | 5020 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 18/02/1957 | 5007 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 2859 | Transfer in from: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 10/04/1957 | 5054 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 8w/e | 20/04/1957 | 3835 | Transfer in from: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 20/04/1957 | 5020 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 8w/e | 20/04/1957 | 6362 | Transfer in from: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 8w/e | 20/04/1957 | 2859 | Transfer out to: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 8w/e | 20/04/1957 | 6621 | Transfer out to: | 86H | Aberbeeg | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 20/04/1957 | 6928 | Transfer out to: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 18/05/1957 | 8439 | Transfer in from: | 86H | Aberbeeg | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 13/07/1957 | 4297 | Transfer in from: | 86J | Aberdare | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 13/07/1957 | 4999 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 13/07/1957 | 5989 | Transfer in from: | SHL | Southall | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 13/07/1957 | 6928 | Transfer in from: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 13/07/1957 | 6958 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 13/07/1957 | 3854 | Transfer out to: | 86G | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 13/07/1957 | 5633 | Transfer out to: | 86J | Aberdare | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 13/07/1957 | 90148 | Transfer out to: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 2859 | Transfer in from: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 2895 | Transfer in from: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 75022 | Transfer in from: | 87K | Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/09/1957 | 5989 | Transfer out to: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/09/1957 | 6928 | Transfer out to: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 20/09/1957 | 5004 | Transfer in from: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 05/10/1957 | 2813 | Transfer in from: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/10/1957 | 6338 | Transfer in from: | 87J | Fishguard Goodwick | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | m/e | 11/1957 | 5334 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 02/11/1957 | 2864 | Transfer in from: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 02/11/1957 | 2867 | Transfer in from: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 02/11/1957 | 2893 | Transfer in from: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 02/11/1957 | 5727 | Transfer in from: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/11/1957 | 4964 | Transfer out to: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/11/1957 | 6338 | Transfer out to: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/11/1957 | 6362 | Transfer out to: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/11/1957 | 7322 | Transfer out to: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/11/1957 | 9306 | Transfer out to: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 9450 | Transfer in from: | 86H | Aberbeeg | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 30/11/1957 | 5020 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 5727 | Transfer out to: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 9459 | Transfer out to: | 86H | Aberbeeg | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 22/01/1958 | 5001 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 23/01/1958 | 7022 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 5727 | Transfer in from: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 8429 | Transfer in from: | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 8441 | Transfer in from: | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 8457 | Transfer in from: | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 8464 | Transfer in from: | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 9437 | Transfer in from: | 87B | Duffryn Yard | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 9443 | Transfer in from: | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 9477 | Transfer in from: | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 4968 | Transfer out to: | 86G | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 6353 | Transfer out to: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 6946 | Transfer out to: | 86G | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 22/02/1958 | 8484 | Transfer in from: | 86H | Aberbeeg | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/02/1958 | 4934 | Transfer out to: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/02/1958 | 6969 | Transfer out to: | 81E | Didcot | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 22/02/1958 | 8429 | Transfer out to: | 86H | Aberbeeg | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 20/03/1958 | 4081 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 20/03/1958 | 5003 | Transfer in from: | 87G | Carmarthen | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 20/03/1958 | 5004 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 20/03/1958 | 5046 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 2816 | Transfer in from: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 2847 | Transfer in from: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 2889 | Transfer in from: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 3855 | Transfer in from: | 86G | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 5685 | Transfer in from: | 86H | Aberbeeg | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 5923 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 6644 | Transfer out to: | 86H | Aberbeeg | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 6948 | Transfer out to: | 85C | Hereford | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 04/1958 | 5786 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/04/1958 | 4982 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 16/05/1958 | 4081 | Transfer out to: | 83C | Exeter | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 17/05/1958 | 2826 | Transfer in from: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/05/1958 | 4974 | Transfer out to: | 86G | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/05/1958 | 75009 | Transfer out to: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 12/06/1958 | 5095 | Transfer out to: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 5260 | Transfer in from: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 5337 | Transfer in from: | 85C | Hereford | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 5360 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 6326 | Transfer in from: | 85C | Hereford | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 24/06/1958 | 5095 | Transfer in from: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 12/07/1958 | 70015 | Transfer out to: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 12/07/1958 | 70017 | Transfer out to: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 12/07/1958 | 70021 | Transfer out to: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 24/07/1958 | 5078 | Transfer in from: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 09/08/1958 | 9450 | Transfer out to: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 19/08/1958 | 5030 | Transfer out to: | 87G | Carmarthen | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 26/08/1958 | 5099 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | m/e | 09/1958 | 5360 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 5962 | Transfer in from: | 84K | Chester West | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 6338 | Transfer in from: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 6901 | Transfer in from: | 84K | Chester West | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 6942 | Transfer in from: | 84K | Chester West | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 6963 | Transfer in from: | 84K | Chester West | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 3803 | Transfer out to: | 87F | Llanelli | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 73014 | Transfer out to: | 6E | Chester West | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 73024 | Transfer out to: | 6E | Chester West | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 73025 | Transfer out to: | 6E | Chester West | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 73026 | Transfer out to: | 6E | Chester West | ||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 7805 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 7809 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 7814 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 7815 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 90573 | Transfer in from: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 90685 | Transfer in from: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 90691 | Transfer in from: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 2805 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 2816 | Transfer out to: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 2826 | Transfer out to: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 6338 | Transfer out to: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 75004 | Transfer out to: | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 75007 | Transfer out to: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 75022 | Transfer out to: | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 4w/e | 01/11/1958 | 7227 | Transfer in from: | 88C | Barry | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1958 | 92003 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1958 | 92005 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1958 | 4996 | Transfer out to: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1958 | 5925 | Transfer out to: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1958 | 6942 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1958 | 75008 | Transfer out to: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 29/11/1958 | 8466 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 29/11/1958 | 92236 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 29/11/1958 | 92237 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 29/11/1958 | 2813 | Transfer out to: | 86J | Aberdare | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/11/1958 | 4982 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 4w/e | 29/11/1958 | 7227 | Transfer out to: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 02/12/1958 | 5078 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 27/12/1958 | 2834 | Transfer in from: | 86G | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 27/12/1958 | 5261 | Transfer in from: | 87F | Llanelli | ||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 4w/e | 27/12/1958 | 7227 | Transfer in from: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 27/12/1958 | 2821 | Transfer out to: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 27/12/1958 | 2847 | Transfer out to: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/12/1958 | 7809 | Transfer out to: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/12/1958 | 7815 | Transfer out to: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 24/01/1959 | 4271 | Transfer in from: | 86G | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 24/01/1959 | 9453 | Transfer in from: | 88C | Barry | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 24/01/1959 | 2837 | Transfer out to: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/01/1959 | 5337 | Transfer out to: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/02/1959 | 4956 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/02/1959 | 5910 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/02/1959 | 6935 | Transfer in from: | 87G | Carmarthen | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/02/1959 | 6936 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 21/02/1959 | 92231 | Transfer in from: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 21/02/1959 | 92232 | Transfer in from: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 21/02/1959 | 92233 | Transfer in from: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 21/02/1959 | 92234 | Transfer in from: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 21/02/1959 | 92235 | Transfer in from: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 21/02/1959 | 2859 | Transfer out to: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 21/02/1959 | 2867 | Transfer out to: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 21/02/1959 | 2892 | Transfer out to: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 21/02/1959 | 2893 | Transfer out to: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/02/1959 | 5679 | Transfer out to: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/02/1959 | 7814 | Transfer out to: | 89C | Machynlleth | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | m/e | 03/1959 | 4226 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 17/03/1959 | 5003 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/03/1959 | 7913 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 11/04/1959 | 73021 | Transfer in from: | 84K | Chester West | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 11/04/1959 | 73023 | Transfer in from: | 84K | Chester West | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 11/04/1959 | 73024 | Transfer in from: | 6E | Chester West | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/04/1959 | 4983 | Transfer in from: | 87G | Carmarthen | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 18/04/1959 | 5225 | Transfer in from: | NEA | Neath (Court Sart) | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/04/1959 | 5937 | Transfer in from: | 87G | Carmarthen | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 16/05/1959 | 3849 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/05/1959 | 4952 | Transfer in from: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | m/e | 06/1959 | 2864 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 06/1959 | 9443 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 13/06/1959 | 3836 | Transfer in from: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 13/06/1959 | 3842 | Transfer out to: | 86G | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 4w/e | 13/06/1959 | 7227 | Transfer out to: | 86G | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 11/07/1959 | 4230 | Transfer in from: | 86G | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 11/07/1959 | 3801 | Transfer out to: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 11/07/1959 | 3816 | Transfer out to: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 11/07/1959 | 3846 | Transfer out to: | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 11/07/1959 | 4271 | Transfer out to: | 87F | Llanelli | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/07/1959 | 4983 | Transfer out to: | 86G | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/07/1959 | 5937 | Transfer out to: | 87G | Carmarthen | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/07/1959 | 5970 | Transfer out to: | 86G | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/07/1959 | 6901 | Transfer out to: | 87F | Llanelli | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/07/1959 | 6958 | Transfer out to: | 87F | Llanelli | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 11/07/1959 | 90572 | Transfer out to: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 18/07/1959 | 90238 | Transfer out to: | 18B | Westhouses | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 18/07/1959 | 90524 | Transfer out to: | 18B | Westhouses | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | m/e | 08/1959 | 6308 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/08/1959 | 6859 | Transfer in from: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/08/1959 | 6864 | Transfer in from: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 08/08/1959 | 90572 | Transfer in from: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 29/08/1959 | 92166 | Transfer in from: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | on | 31/08/1959 | 92210 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/09/1959 | 2223 | Transfer in from: | 87J | Fishguard Goodwick | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 05/09/1959 | 2818 | Transfer in from: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 05/09/1959 | 48707 | Transfer in from: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 05/09/1959 | 48737 | Transfer in from: | 87K | Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 05/09/1959 | 48768 | Transfer in from: | 87K | Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 05/09/1959 | 92209 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 05/09/1959 | 4297 | Transfer out to: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 22/09/1959 | 5021 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 22/09/1959 | 7006 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 03/10/1959 | 48460 | Transfer in from: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 03/10/1959 | 92004 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/10/1959 | 2223 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 03/10/1959 | 2818 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 03/10/1959 | 3836 | Transfer out to: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 03/10/1959 | 6600 | Transfer out to: | 86D | Llantrisant | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 03/10/1959 | 92166 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 03/10/1959 | 92232 | Transfer out to: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 03/10/1959 | 92233 | Transfer out to: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 03/10/1959 | 92234 | Transfer out to: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 03/10/1959 | 92235 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | on | 31/10/1959 | 92214 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 31/10/1959 | 2821 | Transfer in from: | 81E | Didcot | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/10/1959 | 4928 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/10/1959 | 4931 | Transfer in from: | 83G | Penzance | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/10/1959 | 7925 | Transfer in from: | 83G | Penzance | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 31/10/1959 | 90069 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 31/10/1959 | 90149 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 31/10/1959 | 4622 | Transfer out to: | 83F | Truro | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 31/10/1959 | 48737 | Transfer out to: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 31/10/1959 | 48768 | Transfer out to: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/10/1959 | 6963 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 31/10/1959 | 8439 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 31/10/1959 | 92231 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/11/1959 | 6832 | Transfer in from: | 85D | Kidderminster | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/11/1959 | 6847 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/11/1959 | 6963 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/11/1959 | 6333 | Transfer out to: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 28/11/1959 | 8464 | Transfer out to: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 28/11/1959 | 90565 | Transfer out to: | 85E | Gloucester Barnwood | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 28/11/1959 | 90685 | Transfer out to: | 85E | Gloucester Barnwood | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 28/11/1959 | 92214 | Transfer out to: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 28/11/1959 | 9477 | Transfer out to: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | m/e | 12/1959 | 4231 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 09/12/1959 | 4086 | Transfer in from: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 09/12/1959 | 5061 | Transfer in from: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 22/12/1959 | 4084 | Transfer in from: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 26/12/1959 | 4298 | Transfer in from: | 87F | Llanelli | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 26/12/1959 | 48707 | Transfer out to: | 87F | Llanelli | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | on | 31/12/1959 | 92216 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | on | 31/12/1959 | 92217 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | m/e | 01/1960 | 2877 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 30/01/1960 | 48450 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/01/1960 | 6822 | Transfer in from: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 30/01/1960 | 9775 | Transfer in from: | LDR | Landore | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 30/01/1960 | 2895 | Transfer out to: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 30/01/1960 | 3843 | Transfer out to: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/01/1960 | 4946 | Transfer out to: | 83B | Taunton | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/01/1960 | 5946 | Transfer out to: | 83B | Taunton | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 30/01/1960 | 92217 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | on | 31/01/1960 | 92219 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/02/1960 | 6833 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 27/02/1960 | 90485 | Transfer in from: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 27/02/1960 | 92231 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 27/02/1960 | 48450 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 27/02/1960 | 48460 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 27/02/1960 | 92004 | Transfer out to: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 26/03/1960 | 2865 | Transfer in from: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 26/03/1960 | 90312 | Transfer out to: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 26/03/1960 | 9453 | Transfer out to: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | on | 31/03/1960 | 92220 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 04/04/1960 | 7011 | Transfer in from: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/04/1960 | 6858 | Transfer in from: | 83G | Penzance | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/04/1960 | 73021 | Transfer out to: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/04/1960 | 73024 | Transfer out to: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 23/04/1960 | 90485 | Transfer out to: | 85E | Gloucester Barnwood | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 05/1960 | 5727 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 05/1960 | 5776 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 10/05/1960 | 4073 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/05/1960 | 5903 | Transfer in from: | 87F | Llanelli | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/05/1960 | 6858 | Transfer out to: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/05/1960 | 73023 | Transfer out to: | 87F | Llanelli | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 5220 | Transfer in from: | DYD | Duffryn Yard | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 8497 | Transfer in from: | 86F | Tondu | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 8722 | Transfer in from: | 85C | Hereford | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 90485 | Transfer in from: | 85E | Gloucester Barnwood | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 9777 | Transfer in from: | LDR | Landore | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 9794 | Transfer in from: | 84J | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 2865 | Transfer out to: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 3817 | Transfer out to: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 3835 | Transfer out to: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 4230 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 6832 | Transfer out to: | 87F | Llanelli | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 05/07/1960 | 5044 | Transfer in from: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 05/07/1960 | 7006 | Transfer out to: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 4w/e | 16/07/1960 | 7209 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 16/07/1960 | 9777 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 02/08/1960 | 4080 | Transfer in from: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 02/08/1960 | 5081 | Transfer in from: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 02/08/1960 | 5092 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 02/08/1960 | 7023 | Transfer out to: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 13/08/1960 | 6345 | Transfer in from: | 87F | Llanelli | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 13/08/1960 | 6909 | Transfer in from: | 87H | Neyland | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 13/08/1960 | 8425 | Transfer in from: | 84A | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 13/08/1960 | 4266 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 13/08/1960 | 4298 | Transfer out to: | 87F | Llanelli | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 13/08/1960 | 5602 | Transfer out to: | 87F | Llanelli | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | m/e | 09/1960 | 2821 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | m/e | 09/1960 | 6343 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 08/09/1960 | 5095 | Transfer out to: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | 92210 | Transfer out to: | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/09/1960 | 5021 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 16/09/1960 | 5097 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 03/10/1960 | 5021 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 4971 | Transfer in from: | TN | Taunton | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 5984 | Transfer in from: | 87G | Carmarthen | ||
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 6019 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 6849 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 6854 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 6944 | Transfer in from: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 7820 | Transfer in from: | 83E | St Blazey | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 7927 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 92231 | Transfer out to: | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 11/10/1960 | 5072 | Transfer in from: | 84A | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 11/10/1960 | 4084 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 31/10/1960 | 5072 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 03/11/1960 | 5048 | Transfer in from: | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 05/11/1960 | 92241 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 05/11/1960 | 92244 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 05/11/1960 | 92245 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 05/11/1960 | 92246 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/11/1960 | 6849 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/11/1960 | 6854 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 05/11/1960 | 90188 | Transfer out to: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 05/11/1960 | 90323 | Transfer out to: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 05/11/1960 | 90691 | Transfer out to: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 09/11/1960 | 7775 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 10/11/1960 | 4077 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | on | 21/11/1960 | 6352 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 30/11/1960 | 4077 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/12/1960 | 6349 | Transfer in from: | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 03/12/1960 | 5685 | Transfer out to: | 88C | Barry | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/12/1960 | 5910 | Transfer out to: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 23/12/1960 | 7011 | Transfer out to: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 31/12/1960 | 3784 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 31/12/1960 | 9681 | Transfer in from: | 89A | Oswestry | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1960 | 2874 | Transfer out to: | 88J | Aberdare | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 31/12/1960 | 4225 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1960 | 6963 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | m/e | 01/1961 | 5207 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 01/1961 | 8457 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 28/01/1961 | 92227 | Transfer in from: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 28/01/1961 | 92233 | Transfer in from: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 28/01/1961 | 2889 | Transfer out to: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 28/01/1961 | 3809 | Transfer out to: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 28/01/1961 | 3855 | Transfer out to: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/01/1961 | 4999 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 28/01/1961 | 90693 | Transfer out to: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 25/02/1961 | 3804 | Transfer in from: | 86G | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 25/02/1961 | 4652 | Transfer out to: | 86B | Newport Pill | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 09/03/1961 | 5081 | Transfer out to: | 86C | Hereford | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 25/03/1961 | 90201 | Transfer out to: | 81E | Didcot | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 04/1961 | 8722 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 22/04/1961 | 9727 | Transfer in from: | GLO | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 05/1961 | 3670 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 10/05/1961 | 5081 | Transfer in from: | 86C | Hereford | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 10/05/1961 | 4086 | Transfer out to: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/05/1961 | 4977 | Transfer in from: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 20/05/1961 | 92005 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 20/05/1961 | 92209 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 13/06/1961 | 5044 | Transfer out to: | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 17/06/1961 | 8774 | Transfer in from: | 87D | Swansea East Dock | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 05/07/1961 | 5044 | Transfer in from: | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 05/07/1961 | 5048 | Transfer out to: | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 15/07/1961 | 9493 | Transfer out to: | 85D | Bromsgrove | ||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 4w/e | 15/07/1961 | 7243 | Transfer in from: | 87B | Duffryn Yard | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 08/1961 | 8774 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 09/09/1961 | 3748 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 09/09/1961 | 5685 | Transfer in from: | 88C | Barry | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 09/09/1961 | 9494 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | on | 10/09/1961 | 70016 | Transfer out to: | 12C | Carlisle Canal | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | on | 10/09/1961 | 70018 | Transfer out to: | 12C | Carlisle Canal | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | on | 10/09/1961 | 70019 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | on | 10/09/1961 | 70020 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | on | 10/09/1961 | 70022 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | on | 10/09/1961 | 70024 | Transfer out to: | 21D | Aston | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | on | 10/09/1961 | 70025 | Transfer out to: | 21D | Aston | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | on | 10/09/1961 | 70026 | Transfer out to: | 21D | Aston | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | on | 10/09/1961 | 70027 | Transfer out to: | 21D | Aston | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | on | 10/09/1961 | 70028 | Transfer out to: | 21D | Aston | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | on | 10/09/1961 | 70029 | Transfer out to: | 21D | Aston | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 11/09/1961 | 5053 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 11/09/1961 | 5073 | Transfer in from: | 83B | Taunton | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 11/09/1961 | 5091 | Transfer in from: | 87F | Llanelli | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 11/09/1961 | 7016 | Transfer in from: | 87F | Llanelli | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 13/09/1961 | 4083 | Transfer in from: | 83C | Exeter | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 20/09/1961 | 5096 | Transfer in from: | 83B | Taunton | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | m/e | 10/1961 | 4207 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 07/10/1961 | 5020 | Transfer in from: | 83C | Exeter | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 5909 | Transfer in from: | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 5961 | Transfer in from: | 87G | Carmarthen | ||
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 6010 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 6024 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 6912 | Transfer in from: | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 6918 | Transfer in from: | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 6950 | Transfer in from: | 87G | Carmarthen | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 6995 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 5218 | Transfer out to: | 86F | Aberbeeg | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 5260 | Transfer out to: | 87F | Llanelli | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | 4935 | Transfer in from: | 87J | Fishguard Goodwick | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | 6957 | Transfer in from: | 82D | Westbury | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | 92001 | Transfer in from: | 82F | Bath Green Park (S&D) | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | 2834 | Transfer out to: | 81E | Didcot | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | 3845 | Transfer out to: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | 90485 | Transfer out to: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/12/1961 | 4918 | Transfer in from: | 84A | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/12/1961 | 5935 | Transfer in from: | 82D | Westbury | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 02/12/1961 | 92208 | Transfer in from: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 19/12/1961 | 4083 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 30/12/1961 | 3663 | Transfer in from: | 86D | Llantrisant | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 30/12/1961 | 4242 | Transfer in from: | 87F | Llanelli | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 30/12/1961 | 8441 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 27/01/1962 | 2887 | Transfer in from: | STJ | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 27/01/1962 | 3853 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 27/01/1962 | 5075 | Transfer in from: | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/01/1962 | 7317 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 20/02/1962 | 5099 | Transfer out to: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 24/02/1962 | 6630 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 24/02/1962 | 92247 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 24/02/1962 | 4254 | Transfer out to: | 86B | Newport Pill | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/02/1962 | 4935 | Transfer out to: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/02/1962 | 4956 | Transfer out to: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/02/1962 | 6833 | Transfer out to: | 83G | Penzance | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/02/1962 | 6864 | Transfer out to: | 83G | Penzance | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/02/1962 | 6943 | Transfer out to: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 26/02/1962 | D7022 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 15/03/1962 | D7025 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 16/03/1962 | D7024 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 24/03/1962 | 5224 | Transfer in from: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 24/03/1962 | 6681 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 4w/e | 24/03/1962 | D7023 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 24/03/1962 | 8471 | Transfer in from: | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/03/1962 | 6019 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 03/04/1962 | 5044 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 05/04/1962 | D7028 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 17/04/1962 | D7029 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 19/04/1962 | D7030 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 21/04/1962 | 5043 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 4w/e | 21/04/1962 | D7010 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 25/04/1962 | D7031 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 05/1962 | 4977 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 05/1962 | 5935 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 05/05/1962 | D7032 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 19/05/1962 | 3751 | Transfer in from: | 81E | Didcot | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/05/1962 | 4936 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 19/05/1962 | 3849 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 4w/e | 19/05/1962 | 7243 | Transfer out to: | 87G | Carmarthen | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 23/05/1962 | D7034 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 24/05/1962 | D7033 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | m/e | 06/1962 | 6010 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | m/e | 06/1962 | 6024 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 04/06/1962 | D7035 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 05/06/1962 | D7036 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 16/06/1962 | 8445 | Transfer in from: | 86J | Aberdare | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 16/06/1962 | 3751 | Transfer out to: | 81E | Didcot | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/06/1962 | 4928 | Transfer out to: | 87F | Llanelli | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/06/1962 | 5903 | Transfer out to: | 87F | Llanelli | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/06/1962 | 6349 | Transfer out to: | 87F | Llanelli | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 16/06/1962 | 8723 | Transfer out to: | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 16/06/1962 | 92245 | Transfer out to: | 82F | Bath Green Park (S&D) | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 18/06/1962 | D7037 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 18/06/1962 | D7038 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 22/06/1962 | D7039 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 07/1962 | 4931 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 07/1962 | 4973 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 07/1962 | 9723 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 13/07/1962 | 5053 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 3862 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 4984 | Transfer in from: | 83C | Exeter | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 6366 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 14/07/1962 | 5020 | Transfer out to: | 87F | Llanelli | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 14/07/1962 | 5075 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 92001 | Transfer out to: | 82F | Bath Green Park (S&D) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 92233 | Transfer out to: | 82F | Bath Green Park (S&D) | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | on | 30/07/1962 | 5909 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 08/1962 | 4971 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/08/1962 | 4942 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/08/1962 | 4953 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 11/08/1962 | 92210 | Transfer in from: | 82F | Bath Green Park (S&D) | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 11/08/1962 | 5685 | Transfer out to: | 88E | Abercynon | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 11/08/1962 | 92220 | Transfer out to: | 82F | Bath Green Park (S&D) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 11/08/1962 | 92227 | Transfer out to: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 11/08/1962 | 92247 | Transfer out to: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 11/08/1962 | 9759 | Transfer out to: | 88E | Abercynon | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 30/08/1962 | 90125 | Transfer out to: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | 15xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 09/1962 | 1508 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | m/e | 09/1962 | 4270 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 09/1962 | 4952 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 09/1962 | 4984 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 09/1962 | 5911 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | m/e | 09/1962 | 6366 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | m/e | 09/1962 | 6630 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 09/1962 | 8445 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 07/09/1962 | 4080 | Transfer out to: | 88L | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 07/09/1962 | 5043 | Transfer out to: | 88L | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 07/09/1962 | 5073 | Transfer out to: | 88L | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 07/09/1962 | 5081 | Transfer out to: | 88L | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 07/09/1962 | 5091 | Transfer out to: | 88L | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 07/09/1962 | 5092 | Transfer out to: | 88L | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 07/09/1962 | 5096 | Transfer out to: | 88L | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 07/09/1962 | 5097 | Transfer out to: | 88L | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 07/09/1962 | 7016 | Transfer out to: | 88L | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 08/09/1962 | D6742 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 2887 | Transfer out to: | 88L | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 3663 | Transfer out to: | 88C | Barry | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 3748 | Transfer out to: | 88C | Barry | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 3755 | Transfer out to: | 88L | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 3784 | Transfer out to: | 88L | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 3804 | Transfer out to: | 88L | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 3810 | Transfer out to: | 88L | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 3853 | Transfer out to: | 88J | Aberdare | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 3860 | Transfer out to: | 88J | Aberdare | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 3862 | Transfer out to: | 88L | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 4242 | Transfer out to: | 88L | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 4633 | Transfer out to: | 88L | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 4918 | Transfer out to: | 88L | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 4936 | Transfer out to: | 88L | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 4942 | Transfer out to: | 88L | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 4953 | Transfer out to: | 88L | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 5220 | Transfer out to: | 88L | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 5224 | Transfer out to: | 88L | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 5225 | Transfer out to: | 88L | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 5261 | Transfer out to: | 88L | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 5749 | Transfer out to: | 88L | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 5962 | Transfer out to: | 88L | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 6326 | Transfer out to: | 88L | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 6345 | Transfer out to: | 88L | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 6681 | Transfer out to: | 88L | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 6822 | Transfer out to: | 88L | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 6847 | Transfer out to: | 88L | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 6859 | Transfer out to: | 88L | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 6909 | Transfer out to: | 88L | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 6912 | Transfer out to: | 88L | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 6918 | Transfer out to: | 88L | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 6932 | Transfer out to: | 88L | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 6935 | Transfer out to: | 88L | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 6936 | Transfer out to: | 88L | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 6939 | Transfer out to: | 88L | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 6944 | Transfer out to: | 88L | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 6950 | Transfer out to: | 88L | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 6957 | Transfer out to: | 88L | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 6995 | Transfer out to: | 88L | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 7317 | Transfer out to: | 88L | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 7805 | Transfer out to: | 88L | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 7820 | Transfer out to: | 88L | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 7913 | Transfer out to: | 88L | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 7925 | Transfer out to: | 88L | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 7927 | Transfer out to: | 88L | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 8425 | Transfer out to: | 88C | Barry | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 8466 | Transfer out to: | 88L | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 8471 | Transfer out to: | 88L | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 8484 | Transfer out to: | 88L | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 8728 | Transfer out to: | 88C | Barry | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 8776 | Transfer out to: | 88C | Barry | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 92003 | Transfer out to: | 88L | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 92208 | Transfer out to: | 88L | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 92210 | Transfer out to: | 88L | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 92216 | Transfer out to: | 88L | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 92219 | Transfer out to: | 88L | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 92236 | Transfer out to: | 88L | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 92237 | Transfer out to: | 88L | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 92241 | Transfer out to: | 88L | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 92244 | Transfer out to: | 88L | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 92246 | Transfer out to: | 88L | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 9426 | Transfer out to: | 88L | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 9437 | Transfer out to: | 88C | Barry | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 9461 | Transfer out to: | 88L | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 9603 | Transfer out to: | 88C | Barry | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 9648 | Transfer out to: | 88C | Barry | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 9681 | Transfer out to: | 88C | Barry | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 9713 | Transfer out to: | 88C | Barry | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 9727 | Transfer out to: | 88C | Barry | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 9775 | Transfer out to: | 88C | Barry | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 9794 | Transfer out to: | 88C | Barry | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 21/09/1962 | 5021 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 21/09/1962 | 5061 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 06/10/1962 | D6743 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 5961 | Transfer out to: | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 5984 | Transfer out to: | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 90069 | Transfer out to: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 90149 | Transfer out to: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 90572 | Transfer out to: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 90573 | Transfer out to: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 90579 | Transfer out to: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 7209 | Transfer out to: | 88B | Radyr | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | on | 12/11/1962 | D1044 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 13/11/1962 | D7056 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | on | 16/11/1962 | D1045 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | on | 17/11/1962 | D1012 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 22/11/1962 | D7057 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 28/11/1962 | D7058 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 28/11/1962 | D7059 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | on | 13/12/1962 | D1013 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | on | 14/12/1962 | D1049 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | on | 15/12/1962 | D1048 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 19/12/1962 | D7060 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | on | 24/12/1962 | D1014 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 28/12/1962 | D7063 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 29/12/1962 | D7061 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | on | 01/01/1963 | D1050 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 4w/e | 12/01/1963 | D1048 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | on | 21/01/1963 | D1015 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | on | 21/01/1963 | D1051 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 28/01/1963 | D7065 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 29/01/1963 | D7064 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 31/01/1963 | D7062 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 31/01/1963 | D7066 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | on | 04/02/1963 | D1047 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | on | 04/02/1963 | D1052 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 06/02/1963 | D7067 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | D1035 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | D1043 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | D1046 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | D1048 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | 8497 | Transfer out to: | 88B | Radyr | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 13/02/1963 | D7068 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | on | 16/02/1963 | D1016 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | on | 02/03/1963 | D1054 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | on | 02/03/1963 | D1055 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | on | 08/03/1963 | D1056 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 4w/e | 09/03/1963 | D1053 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 4w/e | 09/03/1963 | D1049 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | on | 15/03/1963 | D1017 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 20/03/1963 | D6829 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 25/03/1963 | D6830 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 27/03/1963 | D6819 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 29/03/1963 | D6820 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 29/03/1963 | D6831 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 03/04/1963 | D6832 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 05/04/1963 | D6833 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | on | 06/04/1963 | D1059 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 4w/e | 06/04/1963 | D1039 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 4w/e | 06/04/1963 | D1040 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 4w/e | 06/04/1963 | D1041 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 4w/e | 06/04/1963 | D1042 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 4w/e | 06/04/1963 | D1013 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 4w/e | 06/04/1963 | D1014 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 4w/e | 06/04/1963 | D1015 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 4w/e | 06/04/1963 | D1035 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 08/04/1963 | D6821 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 10/04/1963 | D6822 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 10/04/1963 | D6834 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 10/04/1963 | D6835 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 19/04/1963 | D6836 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 25/04/1963 | D6823 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 26/04/1963 | D6838 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 29/04/1963 | D6824 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 03/05/1963 | D6839 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 4w/e | 04/05/1963 | D1013 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 4w/e | 04/05/1963 | D1014 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 4w/e | 04/05/1963 | D1037 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 4w/e | 04/05/1963 | D1038 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 4w/e | 04/05/1963 | D1057 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 04/05/1963 | D6742 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 04/05/1963 | D6743 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 08/05/1963 | D6825 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 10/05/1963 | D6841 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 14/05/1963 | D6826 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 17/05/1963 | D6842 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | on | 24/05/1963 | D1064 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 28/05/1963 | D6827 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 29/05/1963 | D6843 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 4w/e | 01/06/1963 | D1060 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 4w/e | 01/06/1963 | D1061 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 4w/e | 01/06/1963 | D1039 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Laira | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 4w/e | 01/06/1963 | D1057 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Laira | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 01/06/1963 | D6821 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 01/06/1963 | D6822 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 01/06/1963 | D6823 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 01/06/1963 | D6833 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 05/06/1963 | D6844 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 05/06/1963 | D7082 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 05/06/1963 | D7083 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 06/06/1963 | D6845 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 07/06/1963 | D6828 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 10/06/1963 | D6846 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 13/06/1963 | D6847 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | on | 14/06/1963 | D1066 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 19/06/1963 | D6848 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 21/06/1963 | D6849 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 24/06/1963 | D7085 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 26/06/1963 | D6859 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 26/06/1963 | D7084 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | D1015 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | D1058 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | D1062 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | D1063 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | D6822 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | D6831 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | D6836 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | D7010 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | D7022 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | D7023 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | D7024 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | D7025 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | D7028 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | D7056 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | D7057 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | D7059 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | D7060 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | D7061 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | D7065 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | D7067 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | D7068 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 01/07/1963 | D6850 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 02/07/1963 | D6851 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 05/07/1963 | D6860 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | on | 18/07/1963 | D1067 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 20/07/1963 | D7086 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 20/07/1963 | D7087 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 23/07/1963 | D7089 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 25/07/1963 | D6857 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 4w/e | 27/07/1963 | D7062 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 4w/e | 27/07/1963 | D7063 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 4w/e | 27/07/1963 | D7064 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 09/1963 | D6841 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | |||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 06/09/1963 | D6872 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 09/09/1963 | D6866 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 15/09/1963 | D6874 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 16/09/1963 | D6867 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 17/09/1963 | D6871 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 20/09/1963 | D6875 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | on | 23/09/1963 | D1023 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 24/09/1963 | D7090 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 24/09/1963 | D7091 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 4w/e | 28/09/1963 | D1011 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 4w/e | 28/09/1963 | D1018 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 4w/e | 28/09/1963 | D1021 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 4w/e | 28/09/1963 | D1022 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 4w/e | 28/09/1963 | D1039 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Laira | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 4w/e | 28/09/1963 | D1057 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Laira | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 4w/e | 28/09/1963 | D1015 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 4w/e | 28/09/1963 | D1041 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 4w/e | 28/09/1963 | D1043 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 4w/e | 28/09/1963 | D1051 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 4w/e | 28/09/1963 | D7058 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | on | 01/10/1963 | D1024 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 02/10/1963 | D6879 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 03/10/1963 | D6877 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1963 | D6868 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 09/10/1963 | D6878 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 10/10/1963 | D6899 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 14/10/1963 | D6876 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 15/10/1963 | D6900 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 18/10/1963 | D6901 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | on | 21/10/1963 | D1069 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 21/10/1963 | D6881 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 23/10/1963 | D6902 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | on | 28/10/1963 | D1070 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 28/10/1963 | D6882 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 29/10/1963 | D6903 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | on | 01/11/1963 | D1025 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | D7001 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | D7003 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | D7011 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | D7015 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | D7021 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | D1053 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 05/11/1963 | D6904 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 29/11/1963 | D1690 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 29/11/1963 | D1691 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 29/11/1963 | D169 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 14/12/1963 | D7080 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 14/12/1963 | D7094 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 16/12/1963 | D7092 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 16/12/1963 | D7096 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 16/12/1963 | D7097 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 21/12/1963 | D1697 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 24/12/1963 | D7095 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 09/01/1964 | D6889 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 13/01/1964 | D6914 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 16/01/1964 | D6919 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 16/01/1964 | D6920 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | D1006 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | D1007 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | D1008 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | D7001 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | D7003 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | D7011 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | D7015 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | D7021 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | D7097 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 18/02/1964 | D1718 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 22/02/1964 | D6919 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 25/02/1964 | D1719 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 24/03/1964 | D1726 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | D1026 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | D6891 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | D1055 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | D1056 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | D1057 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | D1058 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | D1059 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | D1060 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | D1061 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | D1062 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | D1063 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | D1064 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | D1066 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | D1067 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | D1069 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | D1070 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | D1697 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | D7095 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | D7096 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 21/04/1964 | D1728 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 22/04/1964 | D1736 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 28/04/1964 | D1730 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 28/04/1964 | D1732 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 3w/e | 04/05/1964 | D1054 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 3w/e | 04/05/1964 | D1728 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/05/1964 | D1713 | Transfer in from: | 2B | Oxley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/05/1964 | D1690 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Oxley | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 13/05/1964 | D6937 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 23/05/1964 | D1583 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 25/05/1964 | D1586 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 25/05/1964 | D1737 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 27/05/1964 | D1587 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 28/05/1964 | D1738 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 29/05/1964 | D1588 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 29/05/1964 | D1589 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 29/05/1964 | D1742 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 30/05/1964 | D1590 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 05/06/1964 | D1591 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 06/06/1964 | D1592 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 09/06/1964 | D1593 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 09/06/1964 | D1741 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 16/06/1964 | D1594 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 16/06/1964 | D1595 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 16/06/1964 | D1731 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 19/06/1964 | D1744 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 22/06/1964 | D1596 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 22/06/1964 | D1597 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | D3365 | Transfer in from: | 88M | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | D1006 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | D1021 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | D1024 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | D1039 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | D1732 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | D7089 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Laira | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | D7090 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Laira | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | D7092 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | D7094 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 29/06/1964 | D1598 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 20/07/1964 | D1735 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 20/07/1964 | D1739 | Transfer in from: | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 20/07/1964 | D6821 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 20/07/1964 | D6889 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 20/07/1964 | D6898 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 20/07/1964 | D6914 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 20/07/1964 | D6917 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 20/07/1964 | D6935 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 20/07/1964 | D6936 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 20/07/1964 | D6889 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 20/07/1964 | D6914 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | on | 27/07/1964 | D9501 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 21/08/1964 | D6939 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 5w/e | 24/08/1964 | D6916 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 5w/e | 24/08/1964 | D6938 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 25/08/1964 | D1613 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 25/08/1964 | D1614 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 27/08/1964 | D6940 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | on | 28/08/1964 | D9507 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 29/08/1964 | D1615 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | on | 31/08/1964 | D9506 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 03/09/1964 | D6941 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | on | 07/09/1964 | D9508 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | on | 08/09/1964 | D9509 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 10/09/1964 | D6942 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 17/09/1964 | D1757 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 17/09/1964 | D6943 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | on | 17/09/1964 | D9511 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | on | 18/09/1964 | D9510 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 24/09/1964 | D6944 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | on | 29/09/1964 | D9512 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | m/e | 10/1964 | 2891 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 01/10/1964 | D6945 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | on | 06/10/1964 | D9513 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | on | 06/10/1964 | D9514 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 08/10/1964 | D6946 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | D1694 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | D1695 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | D1696 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | D1698 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | D1044 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | D1045 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | D1046 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | D1047 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | D1048 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | D1050 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | D9511 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | on | 17/10/1964 | D9515 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | on | 21/10/1964 | D9516 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 22/10/1964 | D6947 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 30/10/1964 | D6948 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/10/1964 | D9518 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/10/1964 | D9519 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 08/11/1964 | D2128 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Laira | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 08/11/1964 | D3510 | Transfer in from: | 83F | Truro | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 08/11/1964 | D3523 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Laira | ||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | on | 12/11/1964 | D9517 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | on | 12/11/1964 | D9520 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 15/11/1964 | D6852 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 15/11/1964 | D6855 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 15/11/1964 | D6885 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 15/11/1964 | D6892 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 15/11/1964 | D6906 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 15/11/1964 | D6913 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 15/11/1964 | D6926 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 15/11/1964 | D6930 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 15/11/1964 | D9511 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 15/11/1964 | D1583 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 15/11/1964 | D1586 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 15/11/1964 | D1587 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 15/11/1964 | D1588 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 15/11/1964 | D1589 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 15/11/1964 | D1590 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 15/11/1964 | D1591 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 15/11/1964 | D1592 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 15/11/1964 | D1593 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 15/11/1964 | D1594 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 15/11/1964 | D1595 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 15/11/1964 | D1596 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 15/11/1964 | D1597 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 15/11/1964 | D1598 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 15/11/1964 | D1613 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | D3/11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 15101 | Transfer in from: | 88M | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Diesel | D3/11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 15102 | Transfer in from: | 88M | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Diesel | D3/11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 15103 | Transfer in from: | 88M | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Diesel | D3/11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 15104 | Transfer in from: | 88M | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Diesel | D3/11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 15105 | Transfer in from: | 88M | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Diesel | D3/11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 15106 | Transfer in from: | 88M | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | D3256 | Transfer in from: | 88M | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | D3257 | Transfer in from: | 88M | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | D3258 | Transfer in from: | 88M | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | D3259 | Transfer in from: | 88M | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | D3260 | Transfer in from: | 88M | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | D3261 | Transfer in from: | 88M | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | D3262 | Transfer in from: | 88M | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | D3263 | Transfer in from: | 88M | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | D3264 | Transfer in from: | 88M | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | D3265 | Transfer in from: | 88M | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | D3266 | Transfer in from: | 88M | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | D3267 | Transfer in from: | 88M | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | D3363 | Transfer in from: | 88M | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | D3364 | Transfer in from: | 88M | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | D3366 | Transfer in from: | 88M | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | D3397 | Transfer in from: | 88M | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | D3398 | Transfer in from: | 88M | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | D3399 | Transfer in from: | 88M | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | D3400 | Transfer in from: | 88M | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | D3402 | Transfer in from: | 88M | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | D3404 | Transfer in from: | 88M | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | D3405 | Transfer in from: | 88M | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | D3407 | Transfer in from: | 88M | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | D3419 | Transfer in from: | 88M | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | D3420 | Transfer in from: | 88M | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | D3421 | Transfer in from: | 88M | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | D3422 | Transfer in from: | 88M | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | D3423 | Transfer in from: | 88M | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | D3424 | Transfer in from: | 88M | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | D3425 | Transfer in from: | 88M | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | D3426 | Transfer in from: | 88M | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | D3427 | Transfer in from: | 88M | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | D3428 | Transfer in from: | 88M | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | D3527 | Transfer in from: | 88M | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | D3594 | Transfer in from: | 88M | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | D3595 | Transfer in from: | 88M | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | D3603 | Transfer in from: | 88M | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | D3607 | Transfer in from: | 88M | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | D3647 | Transfer in from: | 36C | Frodingham | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | D3648 | Transfer in from: | 36C | Frodingham | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | D3649 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | D3807 | Transfer in from: | 88M | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | D3809 | Transfer in from: | 88M | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | D3823 | Transfer in from: | 88M | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 07/12/1964 | D1637 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 08/12/1964 | D1638 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 09/12/1964 | D6949 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 10/12/1964 | D1636 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 10/12/1964 | D6950 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 14/12/1964 | D1639 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 16/12/1964 | D1640 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 17/12/1964 | D1641 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 19/12/1964 | D1642 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 19/12/1964 | D1643 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 23/12/1964 | D1644 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 24/12/1964 | D1645 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/12/1964 | D3819 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/12/1964 | D2128 | Transfer out to: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 30/12/1964 | D6951 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 31/12/1964 | D1646 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 02/01/1965 | D1647 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 02/01/1965 | D1649 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 05/01/1965 | D6953 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 05/01/1965 | D6954 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 06/01/1965 | D6955 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 07/01/1965 | D6952 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 08/01/1965 | D6956 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 09/01/1965 | D1650 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 09/01/1965 | D1651 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 12/01/1965 | D6957 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 15/01/1965 | D6958 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 16/01/1965 | D1652 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 16/01/1965 | D1653 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 22/01/1965 | D1648 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 23/01/1965 | D1654 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 2w/e | 23/01/1965 | D7087 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 2w/e | 23/01/1965 | D7091 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | on | 26/01/1965 | D9529 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 30/01/1965 | D1655 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | on | 02/02/1965 | D9530 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | on | 02/02/1965 | D9531 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 07/02/1965 | D1636 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 07/02/1965 | D1637 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 07/02/1965 | D1638 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 07/02/1965 | D1639 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 07/02/1965 | D1640 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 07/02/1965 | D1642 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | on | 18/02/1965 | D9532 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | on | 19/02/1965 | D9533 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 21/02/1965 | D3511 | Transfer in from: | 82D | Westbury | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 26/02/1965 | D6969 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | on | 02/03/1965 | D9534 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 04/03/1965 | D6970 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | D1600 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | D1601 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | D1602 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | D1603 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | D1604 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | D1605 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | D1606 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | D1607 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | D1608 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | D1609 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | D1610 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | D1697 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | D1754 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | D1755 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | D1756 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | D1007 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | D1008 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | D1011 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | D1012 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | D1013 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | D1014 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | D1016 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | D1017 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | D1018 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | D1022 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | D1023 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | D1037 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | D1038 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | D1040 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | D1042 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | D1052 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | D1644 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | D1645 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | D1646 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | D1648 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | D1650 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | D1652 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | D1653 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | D1654 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | D1655 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | D3511 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | D6906 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | D6913 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | D6914 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | D6916 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | D6917 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | D7085 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | on | 08/03/1965 | D9535 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 13/03/1965 | D1668 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | on | 16/03/1965 | D9536 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | on | 16/03/1965 | D9537 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 20/03/1965 | D1670 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 26/03/1965 | D6972 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | on | 26/03/1965 | D9538 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 27/03/1965 | D1671 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 27/03/1965 | D1672 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 3w/e | 28/03/1965 | D1583 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 3w/e | 28/03/1965 | D1584 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 3w/e | 28/03/1965 | D1585 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 3w/e | 28/03/1965 | D1751 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 3w/e | 28/03/1965 | D1752 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 3w/e | 28/03/1965 | D1753 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 3w/e | 28/03/1965 | D6913 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 3w/e | 28/03/1965 | D6922 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 3w/e | 28/03/1965 | D6969 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 3w/e | 28/03/1965 | D6970 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 3w/e | 28/03/1965 | D1641 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 3w/e | 28/03/1965 | D1643 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 3w/e | 28/03/1965 | D1647 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 3w/e | 28/03/1965 | D1649 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 3w/e | 28/03/1965 | D1651 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 3w/e | 28/03/1965 | D6969 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 3w/e | 28/03/1965 | D6970 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 03/04/1965 | D1673 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 05/04/1965 | D1674 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 05/04/1965 | D6973 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 06/04/1965 | D6974 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 09/04/1965 | D6975 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | on | 09/04/1965 | D9539 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 10/04/1965 | D1675 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 11/04/1965 | D1669 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 15/04/1965 | D6976 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 16/04/1965 | D1676 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 22/04/1965 | D6977 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | on | 22/04/1965 | D9540 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 23/04/1965 | D6978 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 24/04/1965 | D1677 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 24/04/1965 | D1678 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | on | 27/04/1965 | D9541 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 01/05/1965 | D1679 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 03/05/1965 | D6979 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 06/05/1965 | D6980 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | on | 06/05/1965 | D9542 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 08/05/1965 | D1681 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 11/05/1965 | D1680 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 12/05/1965 | D6981 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 13/05/1965 | D6982 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 13/05/1965 | D6983 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 5w/e | 16/05/1965 | D1735 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 5w/e | 16/05/1965 | D1736 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 5w/e | 16/05/1965 | D1737 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 16/05/1965 | D9508 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 16/05/1965 | D9509 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 16/05/1965 | D9511 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 16/05/1965 | D9516 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 16/05/1965 | D9529 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 16/05/1965 | D9531 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 16/05/1965 | D9535 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 16/05/1965 | D9536 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 21/05/1965 | D6984 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 27/05/1965 | D6985 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | on | 29/05/1965 | D9544 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 01/06/1965 | D6986 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 05/06/1965 | D6878 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 05/06/1965 | D6878 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 06/06/1965 | D6987 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 13/06/1965 | D3432 | Transfer in from: | 87B | Margam | ||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 13/06/1965 | D9528 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 13/06/1965 | D1738 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 13/06/1965 | D1739 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 4w/e | 13/06/1965 | D7037 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 13/06/1965 | D9517 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 13/06/1965 | D9542 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 14/06/1965 | D6988 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 17/06/1965 | D6989 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 18/06/1965 | D6990 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 24/06/1965 | D6991 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 26/06/1965 | D6987 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 26/06/1965 | D6987 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | on | 28/06/1965 | D9543 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | on | 28/06/1965 | D9546 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 01/07/1965 | D6993 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 05/07/1965 | D6992 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 08/07/1965 | D6994 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | D1600 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | D1601 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | D1668 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | D1669 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | D1670 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | D1713 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | D1718 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | D1719 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | D1726 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | D1730 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | D1741 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | D7038 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Laira | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | D7039 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Laira | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | D7066 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | D7080 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | D7082 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | D7086 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Laira | ||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | D9543 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | D9544 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 13/07/1965 | D6995 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 16/07/1965 | D6996 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 21/07/1965 | D6997 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | on | 26/07/1965 | D9548 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/08/1965 | D9546 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 12/08/1965 | D6998 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | on | 19/08/1965 | D9549 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 20/08/1965 | D6999 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 26/08/1965 | D6600 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | on | 27/08/1965 | D9550 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | on | 02/09/1965 | D9551 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | on | 06/09/1965 | D9552 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 09/09/1965 | D1903 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 09/09/1965 | D1904 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 09/09/1965 | D6602 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 17/09/1965 | D1907 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 17/09/1965 | D1963 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 17/09/1965 | D6878 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 17/09/1965 | D6878 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 6w/e | 19/09/1965 | D3527 | Transfer out to: | 81C | Southall | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 6w/e | 19/09/1965 | D7029 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 6w/e | 19/09/1965 | D7030 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 6w/e | 19/09/1965 | D7031 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 6w/e | 19/09/1965 | D7032 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 6w/e | 19/09/1965 | D7033 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 6w/e | 19/09/1965 | D7034 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 6w/e | 19/09/1965 | D7035 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 6w/e | 19/09/1965 | D7036 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 6w/e | 19/09/1965 | D7083 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 6w/e | 19/09/1965 | D7084 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 20/09/1965 | D1901 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 23/09/1965 | D1905 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 24/09/1965 | D1964 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 27/09/1965 | D1962 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 02/10/1965 | D1965 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 02/10/1965 | D1966 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 06/10/1965 | D1902 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 06/10/1965 | D6605 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 07/10/1965 | D1906 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 07/10/1965 | D1908 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 16/10/1965 | D1967 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 19/10/1965 | D1909 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 22/10/1965 | D1910 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 26/10/1965 | D1911 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 26/10/1965 | D1912 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 28/10/1965 | D1913 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 01/11/1965 | D1914 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 7w/e | 07/11/1965 | D6602 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 7w/e | 07/11/1965 | D6885 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 7w/e | 07/11/1965 | D6889 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 16/11/1965 | D1918 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 18/11/1965 | D1916 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 22/11/1965 | D1919 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 30/11/1965 | D1920 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 12/1965 | D1606 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 03/12/1965 | D1915 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 03/12/1965 | D1917 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 03/12/1965 | D1921 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 09/12/1965 | D1922 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 16/12/1965 | D1923 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 20/12/1965 | D1924 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | D1665 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | D1666 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | D1667 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | D1668 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | D1669 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | D1670 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | D3821 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | D1583 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 15/01/1966 | D1584 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | D1585 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | D1602 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | D1603 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | D1604 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | D1605 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | D1607 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | D1608 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | D1609 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | D1610 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | D1614 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | D1615 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | D1694 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | D1742 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | D1744 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | D3819 | Transfer out to: | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/02/1966 | D1691 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/02/1966 | D1695 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/02/1966 | D1696 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/02/1966 | D1697 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/02/1966 | D1698 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/02/1966 | D1691 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/02/1966 | D1695 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/02/1966 | D1696 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/02/1966 | D1697 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/02/1966 | D1698 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 5w/e | 20/02/1966 | D1007 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 5w/e | 20/02/1966 | D1008 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 5w/e | 20/02/1966 | D1011 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 5w/e | 20/02/1966 | D1012 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 5w/e | 20/02/1966 | D1013 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 5w/e | 20/02/1966 | D1014 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 5w/e | 20/02/1966 | D1016 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 5w/e | 20/02/1966 | D1017 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 5w/e | 20/02/1966 | D1018 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 5w/e | 20/02/1966 | D1037 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 5w/e | 20/02/1966 | D1038 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 5w/e | 20/02/1966 | D1040 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 5w/e | 20/02/1966 | D1042 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 5w/e | 20/02/1966 | D1609 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 5w/e | 20/02/1966 | D1610 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 5w/e | 20/02/1966 | D1614 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 5w/e | 20/02/1966 | D1615 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 5w/e | 20/02/1966 | D7018 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 5w/e | 20/02/1966 | D1962 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 5w/e | 20/02/1966 | D1963 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 5w/e | 20/02/1966 | D1964 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 03/1966 | D1695 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 03/1966 | D1696 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 03/1966 | D1697 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 03/1966 | D1698 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 26/03/1966 | D1936 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 5w/e | 27/03/1966 | D1022 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 5w/e | 27/03/1966 | D1023 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 5w/e | 27/03/1966 | D1662 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 5w/e | 27/03/1966 | D1663 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 5w/e | 27/03/1966 | D1664 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 5w/e | 27/03/1966 | D1691 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 27/03/1966 | D3363 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 27/03/1966 | D3364 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | D3/11 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 04/1966 | 15101 | Transfer out to: | 2C | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Diesel | D3/11 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 04/1966 | 15102 | Transfer out to: | 2C | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 07/04/1966 | D1937 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 18/04/1966 | D1671 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 18/04/1966 | D6983 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 27/04/1966 | D1938 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | D1654 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | D1655 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | D1656 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | D3527 | Transfer in from: | 81C | Southall | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | D3759 | Transfer in from: | 81C | Southall | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | D3817 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | D6885 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | D6886 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | D7081 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | D7082 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | D7085 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | D7094 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | D7096 | Transfer in from: | 84A | Laira | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | D7097 | Transfer in from: | 84A | Laira | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | D7098 | Transfer in from: | 84A | Laira | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | D7099 | Transfer in from: | 84A | Laira | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | D7100 | Transfer in from: | 84A | Laira | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | D1007 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Laira | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | D1008 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Laira | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | D1011 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Laira | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | D1012 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Laira | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | D1013 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Laira | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | D1014 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Laira | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | D1016 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Laira | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | D1017 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Laira | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | D1018 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Laira | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | D1022 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Laira | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | D1023 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Laira | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | D1025 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Laira | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | D1026 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Laira | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | D1037 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Laira | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | D1038 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Laira | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | D1040 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Laira | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | D1042 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Laira | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | D1609 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | D1610 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | D1614 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | D1615 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | D1668 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | D1669 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | D1670 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | D1672 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | D1673 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | D1674 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | D1675 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | D1676 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | D1677 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | D1751 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | D3821 | Transfer out to: | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | D6852 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | D6855 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | D6859 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | D6860 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | D6877 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | D6881 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | D6882 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | D6891 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | D6892 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | D9501 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 18/06/1966 | D1965 | Transfer out to: | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 18/06/1966 | D1966 | Transfer out to: | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 18/06/1966 | D1967 | Transfer out to: | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 7w/e | 19/06/1966 | D1636 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 7w/e | 19/06/1966 | D1637 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 7w/e | 19/06/1966 | D1648 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 7w/e | 19/06/1966 | D1649 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 7w/e | 19/06/1966 | D1650 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 7w/e | 19/06/1966 | D1652 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 7w/e | 19/06/1966 | D1653 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 7w/e | 19/06/1966 | D1740 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 7w/e | 19/06/1966 | D3049 | Transfer in from: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 7w/e | 19/06/1966 | D7093 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 7w/e | 19/06/1966 | D6819 | Transfer out to: | 91N | To North Eastern Region | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 7w/e | 19/06/1966 | D6820 | Transfer out to: | 91N | To North Eastern Region | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 7w/e | 19/06/1966 | D6821 | Transfer out to: | 91N | To North Eastern Region | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 7w/e | 19/06/1966 | D6822 | Transfer out to: | 91N | To North Eastern Region | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 7w/e | 19/06/1966 | D6824 | Transfer out to: | 91N | To North Eastern Region | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 7w/e | 19/06/1966 | D6825 | Transfer out to: | 91N | To North Eastern Region | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 7w/e | 19/06/1966 | D6826 | Transfer out to: | 91N | To North Eastern Region | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 7w/e | 19/06/1966 | D6827 | Transfer out to: | 91N | To North Eastern Region | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 7w/e | 19/06/1966 | D6828 | Transfer out to: | 91N | To North Eastern Region | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 7w/e | 19/06/1966 | D6829 | Transfer out to: | 91N | To North Eastern Region | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 7w/e | 19/06/1966 | D6830 | Transfer out to: | 91N | To North Eastern Region | ||
Diesel | D3/11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 25/06/1966 | 15103 | Transfer out to: | 2C | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Diesel | D3/11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/07/1966 | 15104 | Transfer out to: | 2C | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 9w/e | 20/08/1966 | D6839 | Transfer in from: | 88A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 9w/e | 20/08/1966 | D6840 | Transfer in from: | 91X | To Scottish Region | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 9w/e | 20/08/1966 | D6839 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 20/08/1966 | D6842 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 20/08/1966 | D6843 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 20/08/1966 | D6857 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 20/08/1966 | D6839 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 20/08/1966 | D6840 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 10w/e | 28/08/1966 | D1583 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 10w/e | 28/08/1966 | D3033 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 10w/e | 28/08/1966 | D6893 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 10w/e | 28/08/1966 | D6894 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 10w/e | 28/08/1966 | D6895 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 10w/e | 28/08/1966 | D6896 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 10w/e | 28/08/1966 | D6897 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 10w/e | 28/08/1966 | D7074 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 10w/e | 28/08/1966 | D7075 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 10w/e | 28/08/1966 | D7077 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 10w/e | 28/08/1966 | D7079 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 10w/e | 28/08/1966 | D7086 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 10w/e | 28/08/1966 | D7095 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 10w/e | 28/08/1966 | D1662 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 10w/e | 28/08/1966 | D1663 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 10w/e | 28/08/1966 | D1664 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 10w/e | 28/08/1966 | D1665 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 10w/e | 28/08/1966 | D1666 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 10w/e | 28/08/1966 | D1667 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 10w/e | 28/08/1966 | D3397 | Transfer out to: | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Diesel | D3/11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 17/09/1966 | 15105 | Transfer out to: | 2G | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Diesel | D3/11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 17/09/1966 | 15106 | Transfer out to: | 2G | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 19/09/1966 | D1923 | Transfer out to: | 70D | Eastleigh | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 5w/e | 24/09/1966 | D6838 | Transfer out to: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 5w/e | 24/09/1966 | D6844 | Transfer out to: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 5w/e | 24/09/1966 | D6845 | Transfer out to: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 5w/e | 24/09/1966 | D6846 | Transfer out to: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 5w/e | 24/09/1966 | D6847 | Transfer out to: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 5w/e | 24/09/1966 | D6848 | Transfer out to: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 5w/e | 24/09/1966 | D6849 | Transfer out to: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 5w/e | 24/09/1966 | D6850 | Transfer out to: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 5w/e | 24/09/1966 | D6851 | Transfer out to: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 08/10/1966 | D6832 | Transfer out to: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 08/10/1966 | D6834 | Transfer out to: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 08/10/1966 | D6835 | Transfer out to: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 15/10/1966 | D3049 | Transfer out to: | 2E | Saltley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 17/10/1966 | D1921 | Transfer out to: | 70D | Eastleigh | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 17/10/1966 | D1922 | Transfer out to: | 70D | Eastleigh | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 8w/e | 30/10/1966 | D1585 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 8w/e | 30/10/1966 | D1587 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 8w/e | 30/10/1966 | D1591 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 8w/e | 30/10/1966 | D1597 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 8w/e | 30/10/1966 | D1600 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 8w/e | 30/10/1966 | D1668 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 8w/e | 30/10/1966 | D1669 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 8w/e | 30/10/1966 | D1751 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 8w/e | 30/10/1966 | D3187 | Transfer in from: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 8w/e | 30/10/1966 | D3353 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 8w/e | 30/10/1966 | D3819 | Transfer in from: | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 8w/e | 30/10/1966 | D6860 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 8w/e | 30/10/1966 | D6861 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 8w/e | 30/10/1966 | D6862 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 8w/e | 30/10/1966 | D7068 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 8w/e | 30/10/1966 | D7069 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 8w/e | 30/10/1966 | D7070 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 8w/e | 30/10/1966 | D7080 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 8w/e | 30/10/1966 | D7089 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 8w/e | 30/10/1966 | D7091 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 8w/e | 30/10/1966 | D7092 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 8w/e | 30/10/1966 | D1636 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 8w/e | 30/10/1966 | D1637 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 8w/e | 30/10/1966 | D1648 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 03/12/1966 | D6860 | Transfer out to: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 03/12/1966 | D6861 | Transfer out to: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 03/12/1966 | D6862 | Transfer out to: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 31/12/1966 | D6866 | Transfer out to: | 56B | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 31/12/1966 | D6867 | Transfer out to: | 56B | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 31/12/1966 | D6868 | Transfer out to: | 56B | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 31/12/1966 | D6871 | Transfer out to: | 56B | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 09/01/1967 | D1924 | Transfer out to: | 70D | Eastleigh | ||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | on | 12/01/1967 | D9551 | Transfer out to: | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | on | 12/01/1967 | D9552 | Transfer out to: | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | q/e | 15/01/1967 | D3403 | Transfer in from: | 87B | Margam | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 15/01/1967 | D3508 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | q/e | 15/01/1967 | D4011 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | q/e | 15/01/1967 | D6924 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | q/e | 15/01/1967 | D6925 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | q/e | 15/01/1967 | D6927 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | q/e | 15/01/1967 | D7032 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | q/e | 15/01/1967 | D7033 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | q/e | 15/01/1967 | D7083 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | q/e | 15/01/1967 | D7084 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | q/e | 15/01/1967 | D9506 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | q/e | 15/01/1967 | D9507 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | q/e | 15/01/1967 | D9509 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | q/e | 15/01/1967 | D9531 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | q/e | 15/01/1967 | D1754 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | q/e | 15/01/1967 | D1755 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | q/e | 15/01/1967 | D1756 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | q/e | 15/01/1967 | D1757 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | q/e | 15/01/1967 | D3432 | Transfer out to: | 87B | Margam | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | q/e | 15/01/1967 | D3809 | Transfer out to: | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | q/e | 15/01/1967 | D3817 | Transfer out to: | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | q/e | 15/01/1967 | D6893 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | q/e | 15/01/1967 | D6894 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | q/e | 15/01/1967 | D6895 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | q/e | 15/01/1967 | D6896 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | q/e | 15/01/1967 | D9506 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | q/e | 15/01/1967 | D9507 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 15/01/1967 | D9540 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | on | 18/01/1967 | D9541 | Transfer out to: | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | on | 18/01/1967 | D9548 | Transfer out to: | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | on | 18/01/1967 | D9549 | Transfer out to: | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | on | 18/01/1967 | D9550 | Transfer out to: | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | on | 20/01/1967 | D9512 | Transfer out to: | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | on | 23/01/1967 | D9520 | Transfer out to: | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 31/01/1967 | D1592 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 31/01/1967 | D1593 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 31/01/1967 | D1596 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | m/e | 31/01/1967 | D7054 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | m/e | 31/01/1967 | D7055 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | m/e | 31/01/1967 | D7032 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | m/e | 31/01/1967 | D7033 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 25/02/1967 | D6874 | Transfer out to: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 28/02/1967 | D4012 | Transfer in from: | 87B | Margam | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | D6897 | Transfer out to: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | D6898 | Transfer out to: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | D6899 | Transfer out to: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | D6900 | Transfer out to: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | D6901 | Transfer out to: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | D6902 | Transfer out to: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 31/03/1967 | D1595 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 31/03/1967 | D1601 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 31/03/1967 | D1746 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | m/e | 31/03/1967 | D6908 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | m/e | 31/03/1967 | D7050 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | m/e | 31/03/1967 | D7051 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | m/e | 31/03/1967 | D7052 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | m/e | 31/03/1967 | D7053 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | m/e | 31/03/1967 | D6935 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 5w/e | 29/04/1967 | D6903 | Transfer out to: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 30/04/1967 | D1602 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 30/04/1967 | D1604 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 30/04/1967 | D1649 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 30/04/1967 | D1650 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 14/05/1967 | D1652 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 14/05/1967 | D1653 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/05/1967 | D9510 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/05/1967 | D9534 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/05/1967 | D9507 | Transfer out to: | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/05/1967 | D9510 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/05/1967 | D9533 | Transfer out to: | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/05/1967 | D9534 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/05/1967 | D9537 | Transfer out to: | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/05/1967 | D9539 | Transfer out to: | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/05/1967 | D9510 | Transfer out to: | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/05/1967 | D9534 | Transfer out to: | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 31/05/1967 | D6921 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 31/05/1967 | D9500 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 31/05/1967 | D9501 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 31/05/1967 | D9502 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 31/05/1967 | D9526 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 31/05/1967 | D9527 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 31/05/1967 | D9528 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 31/05/1967 | D9555 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 31/05/1967 | D3267 | Transfer out to: | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 31/05/1967 | D6605 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 31/05/1967 | D6930 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 31/05/1967 | D9513 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 31/05/1967 | D9519 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 31/05/1967 | D9528 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 31/05/1967 | D9532 | Transfer out to: | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 31/05/1967 | D9501 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | m/e | 30/06/1967 | D7046 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | m/e | 30/06/1967 | D7047 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | m/e | 30/06/1967 | D7048 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | m/e | 30/06/1967 | D7049 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 30/06/1967 | D9513 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 30/06/1967 | D9519 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | m/e | 30/06/1967 | D6924 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | m/e | 30/06/1967 | D6925 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 30/06/1967 | D9555 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | m/e | 08/1967 | D6945 | Transfer out to: | 56B | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 19/08/1967 | D3648 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | D1584 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | D1586 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | D1588 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | D1589 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | D1731 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | D6601 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | D6602 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | D6603 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | D6905 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | D6906 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | D6907 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | D6909 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | D9517 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | D1600 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | D1601 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | D1602 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | D1604 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | D1654 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | D1655 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | D1656 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | D1668 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | D1731 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | D3353 | Transfer out to: | 91M | To London Midland Region | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | D6946 | Transfer out to: | 91N | To North Eastern Region | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 3w/e | 31/08/1967 | D6947 | Transfer out to: | 56B | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | D6948 | Transfer out to: | 91N | To North Eastern Region | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | D6949 | Transfer out to: | 91N | To North Eastern Region | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | D6950 | Transfer out to: | 91N | To North Eastern Region | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | D6951 | Transfer out to: | 91N | To North Eastern Region | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | D6952 | Transfer out to: | 91N | To North Eastern Region | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | D6953 | Transfer out to: | 91N | To North Eastern Region | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/09/1967 | D3033 | Transfer out to: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/09/1967 | D3187 | Transfer out to: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 30/09/1967 | D1605 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/09/1967 | D3357 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/09/1967 | D3358 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/09/1967 | D3510 | Transfer out to: | Hookagate PAD | |||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 30/09/1967 | D6920 | Transfer out to: | 91N | To North Eastern Region | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 30/09/1967 | D6922 | Transfer out to: | 91N | To North Eastern Region | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 30/09/1967 | D6942 | Transfer out to: | 91N | To North Eastern Region | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 4w/e | 30/09/1967 | D7078 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 14/10/1967 | D1731 | Transfer out to: | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 14/10/1967 | D1740 | Transfer out to: | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 14/10/1967 | D1746 | Transfer out to: | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 21/10/1967 | D3366 | Transfer out to: | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 21/10/1967 | D3398 | Transfer out to: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 28/10/1967 | D3399 | Transfer out to: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 31/10/1967 | D6926 | Transfer out to: | 91N | To North Eastern Region | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 31/10/1967 | D6927 | Transfer out to: | 91N | To North Eastern Region | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 25/11/1967 | D3400 | Transfer out to: | 16A | Toton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 25/11/1967 | D3402 | Transfer out to: | 16A | Toton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 30/12/1967 | D1751 | Transfer out to: | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | ||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/12/1967 | D9531 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | on | 08/01/1968 | D9515 | Transfer out to: | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 27/01/1968 | D6939 | Transfer out to: | 55C | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 27/01/1968 | D6940 | Transfer out to: | 55C | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | on | 10/03/1968 | D9506 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | on | 10/03/1968 | D9513 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | D1590 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | D1594 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | D1598 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | D1599 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | D1754 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | D7073 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | D7076 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | D9500 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | D9502 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | D3365 | Transfer out to: | 91N | To North Eastern Region | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | D3403 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | D3405 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | D3523 | Transfer out to: | 87B | Margam | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | D3823 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | D9500 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | D9502 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 27/04/1968 | D6936 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 27/04/1968 | D6937 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 25/05/1968 | D6872 | Transfer out to: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 10w/e | 01/06/1968 | D7056 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 10w/e | 01/06/1968 | D7057 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 10w/e | 01/06/1968 | D7059 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 10w/e | 01/06/1968 | D7060 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 10w/e | 01/06/1968 | D7063 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 10w/e | 01/06/1968 | D7064 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 10w/e | 01/06/1968 | D7067 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 10w/e | 01/06/1968 | D7088 | Transfer in from: | 84A | Laira | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 5w/e | 01/06/1968 | D6904 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 5w/e | 01/06/1968 | D6905 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 15/06/1968 | D3404 | Transfer out to: | 16C | Derby | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 20/07/1968 | D3407 | Transfer out to: | 16C | Derby | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 20/07/1968 | D3425 | Transfer out to: | 16C | Derby | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 20/07/1968 | D3426 | Transfer out to: | 16C | Derby | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 7w/e | 27/07/1968 | D1921 | Transfer in from: | 70D | Eastleigh | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 7w/e | 27/07/1968 | D1923 | Transfer in from: | 70D | Eastleigh | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 7w/e | 27/07/1968 | D1924 | Transfer in from: | 70D | Eastleigh | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 7w/e | 27/07/1968 | D3267 | Transfer in from: | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 7w/e | 27/07/1968 | D3523 | Transfer in from: | 87B | Margam | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 7w/e | 27/07/1968 | D1669 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 7w/e | 27/07/1968 | D1678 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 3w/e | 29/07/1968 | D1923 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 3w/e | 29/07/1968 | D1924 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 3w/e | 29/07/1968 | D1923 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 3w/e | 29/07/1968 | D1924 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 10/08/1968 | D3427 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 10/08/1968 | D3428 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 10/08/1968 | D3508 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 6w/e | 09/09/1968 | D1922 | Transfer in from: | 70D | Eastleigh | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 14/09/1968 | D1754 | Transfer out to: | D02 | Birmingham Division | ||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | on | 05/10/1968 | D9509 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | on | 05/10/1968 | D9517 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | on | 05/10/1968 | D9519 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | on | 05/10/1968 | D9530 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 9w/e | 09/11/1968 | D1603 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 9w/e | 09/11/1968 | D1606 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 9w/e | 09/11/1968 | D1927 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 9w/e | 09/11/1968 | D1934 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 9w/e | 09/11/1968 | D3527 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 9w/e | 09/11/1968 | D3604 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 9w/e | 09/11/1968 | D3753 | Transfer in from: | 81C | Southall | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 9w/e | 09/11/1968 | D1679 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 9w/e | 09/11/1968 | D1680 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 9w/e | 09/11/1968 | D1681 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 9w/e | 09/11/1968 | D1937 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 9w/e | 09/11/1968 | D1938 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 9w/e | 09/11/1968 | D3527 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 9w/e | 09/11/1968 | D7046 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 9w/e | 09/11/1968 | D7047 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 9w/e | 09/11/1968 | D7048 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 9w/e | 09/11/1968 | D7049 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | on | 09/11/1968 | D9528 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/11/1968 | D9526 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/12/1968 | D9528 | Reinstated | 98W | |||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/12/1968 | D3527 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 5w/e | 09/12/1968 | D1925 | Transfer in from: | 70D | Eastleigh | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 5w/e | 09/12/1968 | D1926 | Transfer in from: | 70D | Eastleigh | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 9w/e | 25/01/1969 | D1925 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 9w/e | 25/01/1969 | D1926 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 9w/e | 25/01/1969 | D3822 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 9w/e | 25/01/1969 | D4179 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 9w/e | 25/01/1969 | D6604 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 9w/e | 25/01/1969 | D6910 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 9w/e | 25/01/1969 | D6912 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 9w/e | 25/01/1969 | D6924 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 9w/e | 25/01/1969 | D1583 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 9w/e | 25/01/1969 | D1587 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 9w/e | 25/01/1969 | D1594 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 9w/e | 25/01/1969 | D1596 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 9w/e | 25/01/1969 | D1925 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 9w/e | 25/01/1969 | D1926 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 9w/e | 25/01/1969 | D6941 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 9w/e | 25/01/1969 | D6943 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 9w/e | 25/01/1969 | D6944 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 9w/e | 25/01/1969 | D7056 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 9w/e | 25/01/1969 | D7057 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 9w/e | 25/01/1969 | D7059 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 9w/e | 25/01/1969 | D7060 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 9w/e | 25/01/1969 | D7100 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 09/02/1969 | D3523 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 09/02/1969 | D3523 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 23/02/1969 | D3523 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 5w/e | 15/03/1969 | D1615 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 5w/e | 15/03/1969 | D1756 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 5w/e | 15/03/1969 | D1603 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 5w/e | 15/03/1969 | D1606 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 15/03/1969 | D9538 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 19/04/1969 | D6912 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 26/04/1969 | D6913 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 6w/e | 03/05/1969 | D3515 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | on | 03/05/1969 | D9500 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | on | 03/05/1969 | D9502 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | on | 03/05/1969 | D9514 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | on | 03/05/1969 | D9518 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | on | 03/05/1969 | D9527 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 24/05/1969 | D6938 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 14/06/1969 | D3267 | Transfer out to: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 14/06/1969 | D3358 | Transfer out to: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 14/06/1969 | D3607 | Transfer out to: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 5w/e | 14/06/1969 | D7050 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | on | 07/1969 | D3649 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 12/08/1969 | D1908 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 8w/e | 16/08/1969 | D1609 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 8w/e | 16/08/1969 | D1605 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 8w/e | 16/08/1969 | D1753 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 27/09/1969 | D3000 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1969 | D3268 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1969 | D4185 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 01/11/1969 | D6604 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 01/11/1969 | D6605 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 01/11/1969 | D6606 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 01/11/1969 | D6607 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 01/11/1969 | D6608 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 01/11/1969 | D6941 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 01/11/1969 | D6943 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 4w/e | 01/11/1969 | D7056 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 01/11/1969 | D1609 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 01/11/1969 | D1615 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 01/11/1969 | D1752 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 01/11/1969 | D1756 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 01/11/1969 | D6604 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 06/12/1969 | D1583 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 06/12/1969 | D1594 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/12/1969 | D4173 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/12/1969 | D4185 | Transfer out to: | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 27/12/1969 | D3817 | Transfer in from: | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 27/12/1969 | D3819 | Transfer out to: | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/01/1970 | D3819 | Transfer in from: | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/01/1970 | D3817 | Transfer out to: | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | on | 15/03/1970 | D3647 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 9w/e | 04/04/1970 | D7047 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 9w/e | 04/04/1970 | D7048 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 9w/e | 04/04/1970 | D7057 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 9w/e | 04/04/1970 | D7059 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 9w/e | 04/04/1970 | D7060 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 9w/e | 04/04/1970 | D1592 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 9w/e | 04/04/1970 | D1593 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 9w/e | 04/04/1970 | D1594 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 9w/e | 04/04/1970 | D1597 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 9w/e | 04/04/1970 | D7051 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 9w/e | 04/04/1970 | D7051 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 7w/e | 29/05/1970 | D3756 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 7w/e | 29/05/1970 | D4179 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | q/e | 22/08/1970 | D1592 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | q/e | 22/08/1970 | D1593 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | q/e | 22/08/1970 | D1594 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | q/e | 22/08/1970 | D1597 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | q/e | 22/08/1970 | D3960 | Transfer in from: | 87B | Margam | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | q/e | 22/08/1970 | D7049 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | q/e | 14/11/1970 | D3743 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | q/e | 14/11/1970 | D3744 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | q/e | 14/11/1970 | D4176 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | q/e | 14/11/1970 | D7058 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | q/e | 14/11/1970 | D7062 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | q/e | 14/11/1970 | D7065 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | q/e | 14/11/1970 | D7072 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | q/e | 14/11/1970 | D7100 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | q/e | 14/11/1970 | D3000 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | q/e | 14/11/1970 | D3807 | Transfer out to: | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | q/e | 14/11/1970 | D6924 | Transfer out to: | 87A | Landore | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | q/e | 14/11/1970 | D6941 | Transfer out to: | 87A | Landore | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | q/e | 14/11/1970 | D6943 | Transfer out to: | 87A | Landore | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | q/e | 14/11/1970 | D3744 | Transfer out to: | 87A | Landore | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 7w/e | 01/01/1971 | D3822 | Transfer out to: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 7w/e | 02/01/1971 | D4011 | Transfer out to: | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 7w/e | 02/01/1971 | D7047 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 8w/e | 27/02/1971 | D7100 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 01/05/1971 | D6914 | Transfer in from: | 56B | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 01/05/1971 | D6917 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 01/05/1971 | D6918 | Transfer in from: | 56B | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 01/05/1971 | D6923 | Transfer in from: | 56B | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 01/05/1971 | D6927 | Transfer in from: | 56B | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 01/05/1971 | D6929 | Transfer in from: | 56B | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 01/05/1971 | D6930 | Transfer in from: | 55C | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 01/05/1971 | D6939 | Transfer in from: | 91N | To North Eastern Region | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | q/e | 22/05/1971 | D4010 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Laira | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | q/e | 22/05/1971 | D4019 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | q/e | 22/05/1971 | D7055 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | q/e | 22/05/1971 | D7056 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | q/e | 22/05/1971 | D7057 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | q/e | 22/05/1971 | D7058 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | q/e | 22/05/1971 | D4173 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | q/e | 22/05/1971 | D7048 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | q/e | 22/05/1971 | D7049 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | q/e | 22/05/1971 | D7051 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | q/e | 22/05/1971 | D7052 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | q/e | 22/05/1971 | D7053 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 4w/e | 22/05/1971 | D7054 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | q/e | 22/05/1971 | D7055 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | q/e | 22/05/1971 | D7056 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | q/e | 22/05/1971 | D7057 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | q/e | 22/05/1971 | D7058 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 6w/e | 03/07/1971 | D3594 | Transfer out to: | 87A | Landore | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 6w/e | 14/08/1971 | D7058 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 6w/e | 14/08/1971 | D7058 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | m/e | 11/09/1971 | D7081 | To Store | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 03/10/1971 | D7058 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 03/10/1971 | D7059 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 03/10/1971 | D7060 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 03/10/1971 | D7062 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 03/10/1971 | D7063 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 03/10/1971 | D7064 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 03/10/1971 | D7067 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 03/10/1971 | D7069 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 03/10/1971 | D7072 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 03/10/1971 | D7078 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 03/10/1971 | D7079 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 03/10/1971 | D7083 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D1684 | Transfer in from: | D02 | Birmingham Division | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D1685 | Transfer in from: | D02 | Birmingham Division | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D1686 | Transfer in from: | D02 | Birmingham Division | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D1687 | Transfer in from: | D02 | Birmingham Division | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D1688 | Transfer in from: | D02 | Birmingham Division | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D1720 | Transfer in from: | D02 | Birmingham Division | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D1722 | Transfer in from: | D02 | Birmingham Division | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D1723 | Transfer in from: | D02 | Birmingham Division | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D1728 | Transfer in from: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D1729 | Transfer in from: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D1730 | Transfer in from: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D1732 | Transfer in from: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D1739 | Transfer in from: | D02 | Birmingham Division | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D1740 | Transfer in from: | D02 | Birmingham Division | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D1741 | Transfer in from: | D02 | Birmingham Division | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D1745 | Transfer in from: | D02 | Birmingham Division | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D1747 | Transfer in from: | D02 | Birmingham Division | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D1750 | Transfer in from: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D1755 | Transfer in from: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D6600 | Transfer out to: | 87A | Landore | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D6601 | Transfer out to: | 87A | Landore | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D6602 | Transfer out to: | 87A | Landore | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D6603 | Transfer out to: | 87A | Landore | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D6604 | Transfer out to: | 87A | Landore | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D6605 | Transfer out to: | 87A | Landore | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D6606 | Transfer out to: | 87A | Landore | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D6607 | Transfer out to: | 87A | Landore | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D6608 | Transfer out to: | 87A | Landore | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D6878 | Transfer out to: | 87A | Landore | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D6879 | Transfer out to: | 87A | Landore | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D7074 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D7075 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 9w/e | 16/10/1971 | D1593 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 9w/e | 16/10/1971 | D1936 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 5w/e | 10/12/1971 | D7073 | To Store | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 8w/e | 01/01/1972 | D7018 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 01/01/1972 | D7070 | Transfer out to: | 98W | |||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 01/01/1972 | D7056 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 01/01/1972 | D7057 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 01/01/1972 | D7065 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 01/01/1972 | D7086 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 01/01/1972 | D7088 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 9w/e | 08/01/1972 | D6837 | Transfer in from: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 08/01/1972 | D6896 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 08/01/1972 | D6913 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 08/01/1972 | D6922 | Transfer in from: | 56B | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 08/01/1972 | D6925 | Transfer in from: | 56B | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 08/01/1972 | D6948 | Transfer in from: | 56B | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 9w/e | 08/01/1972 | D1583 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 9w/e | 08/01/1972 | D1599 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 08/01/1972 | D3357 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 9w/e | 08/01/1972 | D6954 | Transfer out to: | 87A | Landore | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 9w/e | 08/01/1972 | D6955 | Transfer out to: | 87A | Landore | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 9w/e | 08/01/1972 | D6956 | Transfer out to: | 87A | Landore | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 9w/e | 08/01/1972 | D6957 | Transfer out to: | 87A | Landore | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 9w/e | 08/01/1972 | D6958 | Transfer out to: | 87A | Landore | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 9w/e | 08/01/1972 | D6969 | Transfer out to: | 87A | Landore | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | w/e | 08/01/1972 | D7068 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | w/e | 08/01/1972 | D7076 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | w/e | 08/01/1972 | D7077 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | w/e | 08/01/1972 | D7080 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | w/e | 08/01/1972 | D7082 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | w/e | 08/01/1972 | D7084 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | w/e | 08/01/1972 | D7085 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | w/e | 08/01/1972 | D7089 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 9w/e | 11/03/1972 | D3746 | Transfer in from: | 87B | Margam | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 9w/e | 11/03/1972 | D4019 | Transfer out to: | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 19/04/1972 | D7036 | Reinstated | 98W | |||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 2w/e | 19/04/1972 | D7082 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 19/04/1972 | D7082 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 01/05/1972 | D7052 | Reinstated | 98W | |||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 01/05/1972 | D7070 | Reinstated | 98W | |||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 5w/e | 08/05/1972 | D7085 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 5w/e | 08/05/1972 | D7087 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 9w/e | 13/05/1972 | D1716 | Transfer in from: | 87A | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 9w/e | 13/05/1972 | D1717 | Transfer in from: | 87A | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 9w/e | 13/05/1972 | D1718 | Transfer in from: | 87A | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 9w/e | 13/05/1972 | D1928 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 9w/e | 13/05/1972 | D3606 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 9w/e | 13/05/1972 | D7569 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 9w/e | 13/05/1972 | D7588 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 9w/e | 13/05/1972 | D7625 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 9w/e | 13/05/1972 | D7656 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 9w/e | 13/05/1972 | D7657 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 9w/e | 13/05/1972 | D7675 | Transfer in from: | 84A | Laira | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 9w/e | 13/05/1972 | D7676 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 9w/e | 13/05/1972 | D7677 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 9w/e | 13/05/1972 | D1584 | Transfer out to: | 87A | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 9w/e | 13/05/1972 | D1585 | Transfer out to: | 87A | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 9w/e | 13/05/1972 | D1588 | Transfer out to: | 87A | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 9w/e | 13/05/1972 | D1591 | Transfer out to: | 87A | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 9w/e | 13/05/1972 | D1592 | Transfer out to: | 87A | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 13/05/1972 | D1904 | Transfer out to: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 9w/e | 13/05/1972 | D4010 | Transfer out to: | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 3w/e | 13/05/1972 | D7036 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 10/06/1972 | D1905 | Transfer out to: | D02 | Birmingham Division | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 20/06/1972 | D7092 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 08/07/1972 | D7520 | Transfer in from: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 08/07/1972 | D7521 | Transfer in from: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 08/07/1972 | D86 | Transfer in from: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 08/07/1972 | D7052 | Transfer out to: | 98W | |||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 08/07/1972 | D7085 | Transfer out to: | 98W | |||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 22/07/1972 | D1918 | Transfer out to: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 5w/e | 05/08/1972 | D6839 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 5w/e | 05/08/1972 | D6903 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 10/08/1972 | D7091 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 9w/e | 12/08/1972 | D1646 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 9w/e | 12/08/1972 | D1647 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 9w/e | 12/08/1972 | D1930 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 9w/e | 12/08/1972 | D4180 | Transfer in from: | 87A | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 9w/e | 12/08/1972 | D1595 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 9w/e | 12/08/1972 | D1598 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 9w/e | 12/08/1972 | D4012 | Transfer out to: | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 9w/e | 12/08/1972 | D6906 | Transfer out to: | 87A | Landore | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 9w/e | 12/08/1972 | D6907 | Transfer out to: | 87A | Landore | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 9w/e | 12/08/1972 | D6908 | Transfer out to: | 87A | Landore | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 9w/e | 12/08/1972 | D6909 | Transfer out to: | 87A | Landore | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 9w/e | 12/08/1972 | D6910 | Transfer out to: | 87A | Landore | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 9w/e | 12/08/1972 | D6970 | Transfer out to: | 87A | Landore | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 9w/e | 12/08/1972 | D7087 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 19/08/1972 | D1931 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 19/08/1972 | D1919 | Transfer out to: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 02/09/1972 | D1680 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 02/09/1972 | D1590 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 08/09/1972 | D7070 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | w/e | 09/09/1972 | D7084 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 3w/e | 30/09/1972 | D1935 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 3w/e | 30/09/1972 | D4180 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 3w/e | 30/09/1972 | D7096 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 11/10/1972 | D7084 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 14/10/1972 | D1915 | Transfer out to: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 15/10/1972 | D7099 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 16/10/1972 | D7052 | Reinstated | 98W | |||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 16/10/1972 | D7095 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 53 | Co-Co | w/e | 21/10/1972 | D1200 | Transfer in from: | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 01/11/1972 | D7094 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/11/1972 | D1583 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/11/1972 | D1588 | Transfer in from: | 87A | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/11/1972 | D1599 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/11/1972 | D6840 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/11/1972 | D6841 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/11/1972 | D1728 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/11/1972 | D1729 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/11/1972 | D1730 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 11/11/1972 | D3819 | Transfer out to: | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | w/e | 11/11/1972 | D7097 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 30/11/1972 | D7052 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/12/1972 | D7502 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/12/1972 | D7503 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/12/1972 | D7504 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/12/1972 | D7505 | Transfer in from: | 84A | Laira | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/12/1972 | D7625 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Laira | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/12/1972 | D7656 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Laira | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/12/1972 | D7657 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Laira | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/12/1972 | D7675 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Laira | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/12/1972 | D7676 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Laira | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/12/1972 | D7677 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Laira | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | w/e | 30/12/1972 | D7093 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/12/1972 | D3261 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 30/12/1972 | D7098 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 17/02/1973 | D1665 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 17/02/1973 | D1597 | Transfer out to: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 03/03/1973 | D3760 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 17/03/1973 | D3434 | Transfer in from: | 87B | Margam | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 17/03/1973 | D1583 | Transfer out to: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 24/03/1973 | 47057 | Transfer in from: | 87A | Landore | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 16/04/1973 | D7055 | Transfer out to: | 98W | |||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/05/1973 | D1644 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/05/1973 | D1652 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/05/1973 | D1653 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/05/1973 | D1659 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/05/1973 | D1667 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/05/1973 | D1668 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/05/1973 | D1735 | Transfer in from: | D02 | Birmingham Division | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/05/1973 | 47073 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 12/05/1973 | D7518 | Transfer in from: | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Diesel | 53 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/05/1973 | D1200 | Transfer out to: | EJ | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/05/1973 | D1720 | Transfer out to: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/05/1973 | D1722 | Transfer out to: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/05/1973 | D1732 | Transfer out to: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/05/1973 | D1739 | Transfer out to: | OC | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/05/1973 | D1740 | Transfer out to: | OC | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/05/1973 | D1741 | Transfer out to: | OC | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/05/1973 | 47062 | Transfer out to: | LE | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/05/1973 | 47132 | Transfer out to: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/05/1973 | D1659 | Transfer out to: | LE | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 07/07/1973 | D1739 | Transfer in from: | OC | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 07/07/1973 | D1740 | Transfer in from: | OC | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 07/07/1973 | D7508 | Transfer in from: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 07/07/1973 | D1647 | Transfer out to: | OC | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 07/07/1973 | D1653 | Transfer out to: | OC | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 07/07/1973 | 47073 | Transfer out to: | OC | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 11/08/1973 | D3761 | Transfer in from: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/08/1973 | D7517 | Transfer in from: | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 11/08/1973 | D4176 | Transfer out to: | OX | Oxford | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 25/08/1973 | D1589 | Transfer out to: | LE | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 08/09/1973 | D1645 | Transfer in from: | 87A | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 15/09/1973 | D1752 | Transfer in from: | D02 | Birmingham Division | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 15/09/1973 | D1716 | Transfer out to: | BS | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 06/10/1973 | D1712 | Transfer in from: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 06/10/1973 | 47548 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 06/10/1973 | D7506 | Transfer in from: | 84A | Laira | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 06/10/1973 | D7507 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 06/10/1973 | D1594 | Transfer out to: | BS | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 06/10/1973 | 47057 | Transfer out to: | LE | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 10/11/1973 | D1781 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 10/11/1973 | D1896 | Transfer in from: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 10/11/1973 | D1897 | Transfer in from: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 10/11/1973 | D1717 | Transfer out to: | SF | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 10/11/1973 | 47127 | Transfer out to: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 10/11/1973 | 47548 | Transfer out to: | SF | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 10/11/1973 | D7507 | Transfer out to: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 17/11/1973 | D6943 | Transfer in from: | 87A | Landore | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 17/11/1973 | D6954 | Transfer in from: | 87A | Landore | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 17/11/1973 | D6956 | Transfer in from: | 87A | Landore | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 17/11/1973 | D6957 | Transfer in from: | 87A | Landore | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 17/11/1973 | D6837 | Transfer out to: | LE | Landore | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 17/11/1973 | D6839 | Transfer out to: | LE | Landore | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 17/11/1973 | D6840 | Transfer out to: | LE | Landore | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 17/11/1973 | D6841 | Transfer out to: | LE | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 24/11/1973 | 47022 | Transfer in from: | 87A | Landore | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 24/11/1973 | D6944 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 24/11/1973 | 47530 | Transfer out to: | LE | Landore | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 24/11/1973 | D6896 | Transfer out to: | LE | Landore | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 24/11/1973 | D6903 | Transfer out to: | LE | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 08/12/1973 | D1687 | Transfer out to: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 02/02/1974 | D6862 | Transfer in from: | MR | March | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/02/1974 | 37220 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/02/1974 | 37228 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/02/1974 | 37289 | Transfer out to: | LE | Landore | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/02/1974 | D6974 | Transfer out to: | LE | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 02/03/1974 | D1606 | Transfer in from: | D02 | Birmingham Division | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 02/03/1974 | 47068 | Transfer out to: | OC | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/03/1974 | D7588 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 06/04/1974 | 47074 | Transfer in from: | LE | Landore | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 25029 | Transfer in from: | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 25030 | Transfer in from: | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 25031 | Transfer in from: | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 25032 | Transfer in from: | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 25059 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 25063 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 25157 | Transfer in from: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 25159 | Transfer in from: | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 25160 | Transfer in from: | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 25161 | Transfer in from: | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 25162 | Transfer in from: | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 25163 | Transfer in from: | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 25164 | Transfer in from: | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 25165 | Transfer in from: | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 25166 | Transfer in from: | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 25172 | Transfer in from: | WN | Willesden | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 25238 | Transfer in from: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 47025 | Transfer in from: | 87A | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 47030 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 47031 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 47032 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 47054 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 47062 | Transfer in from: | LE | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 47075 | Transfer in from: | LE | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 47084 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 47097 | Transfer out to: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 47463 | Transfer out to: | BS | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 01/06/1974 | 47151 | Transfer in from: | D02 | Birmingham Division | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 01/06/1974 | 47075 | Transfer out to: | OC | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/06/1974 | 08576 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 29/06/1974 | 47096 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 29/06/1974 | 47229 | Transfer in from: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/06/1974 | 08488 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/06/1974 | 08489 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 29/06/1974 | 47080 | Transfer out to: | OC | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 29/06/1974 | 47142 | Transfer out to: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 20/07/1974 | 47185 | Transfer in from: | LE | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 20/07/1974 | 47054 | Transfer out to: | LE | Landore | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 10/08/1974 | 37253 | Transfer in from: | TE | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 10/08/1974 | 37221 | Transfer out to: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 24/08/1974 | 47020 | Transfer in from: | D02 | Birmingham Division | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 24/08/1974 | 47154 | Transfer out to: | BS | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 07/09/1974 | 25156 | Transfer out to: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 21/09/1974 | 47026 | Transfer in from: | D02 | Birmingham Division | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 21/09/1974 | 47084 | Transfer out to: | BS | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 28/09/1974 | 47095 | Transfer in from: | BS | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 28/09/1974 | 47062 | Transfer out to: | BS | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | 37138 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/10/1974 | 47238 | Transfer in from: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/10/1974 | 47241 | Transfer in from: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/10/1974 | 47242 | Transfer in from: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | 25059 | Transfer out to: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | 25063 | Transfer out to: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | 25152 | Transfer out to: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | 25153 | Transfer out to: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | 25155 | Transfer out to: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | 25158 | Transfer out to: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | 25171 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | 25172 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | 25219 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | 25238 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | 47020 | Transfer out to: | LE | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | 47146 | Transfer out to: | LE | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | 47541 | Transfer out to: | YK | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | 47542 | Transfer out to: | GD | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/11/1974 | 37143 | Transfer in from: | LE | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/11/1974 | 47020 | Transfer in from: | LE | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/11/1974 | 47128 | Transfer in from: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/11/1974 | 47142 | Transfer in from: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 16/11/1974 | 47025 | Transfer in from: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 16/11/1974 | 47025 | Transfer out to: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 30/11/1974 | 47001 | Transfer in from: | GD | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 30/11/1974 | 47171 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 07/12/1974 | 25158 | Transfer in from: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 07/12/1974 | 47119 | Transfer in from: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 07/12/1974 | 47121 | Transfer in from: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 07/12/1974 | 47122 | Transfer in from: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 07/12/1974 | 47124 | Transfer in from: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 07/12/1974 | 47125 | Transfer in from: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 07/12/1974 | 47025 | Transfer out to: | GD | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 07/12/1974 | 47060 | Transfer out to: | OC | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 07/12/1974 | 47061 | Transfer out to: | OC | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 21/12/1974 | 47258 | Transfer in from: | LE | Landore | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 21/12/1974 | 08579 | Transfer out to: | EJ | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 21/12/1974 | 47543 | Transfer out to: | LE | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 08/02/1975 | 47056 | Transfer in from: | OC | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 08/02/1975 | 47140 | Transfer in from: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 08/02/1975 | 47146 | Transfer in from: | LE | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 08/02/1975 | 47026 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 08/02/1975 | 47027 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 08/02/1975 | 47029 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 08/03/1975 | 25084 | Transfer in from: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 08/03/1975 | 25085 | Transfer in from: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 15/03/1975 | 47166 | Transfer in from: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 15/03/1975 | 47032 | Transfer out to: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | 46021 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | 46022 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | 46023 | Transfer in from: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | 46024 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | 46025 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | 46026 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | 46028 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | 46047 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | 46048 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | 46049 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | 46051 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | 47069 | Transfer in from: | OC | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | 47070 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | 47072 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 3w/e | 10/05/1975 | 47103 | Transfer in from: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 3w/e | 10/05/1975 | 47105 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | 25157 | Transfer out to: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | 25158 | Transfer out to: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | 25159 | Transfer out to: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | 25160 | Transfer out to: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | 25161 | Transfer out to: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | 25162 | Transfer out to: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | 47001 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | 47020 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | 47030 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | 47031 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | 47140 | Transfer out to: | LE | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | 47146 | Transfer out to: | LE | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | 47147 | Transfer out to: | LE | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | 47157 | Transfer out to: | LE | Landore | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 3w/e | 07/06/1975 | 25171 | Transfer in from: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 3w/e | 07/06/1975 | 25172 | Transfer in from: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 3w/e | 07/06/1975 | 25238 | Transfer in from: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 14/06/1975 | 47249 | Transfer out to: | CD | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | 3w/e | 09/08/1975 | 46020 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 3w/e | 09/08/1975 | 47074 | Transfer out to: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 2w/e | 23/08/1975 | 25084 | Transfer out to: | HA | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 2w/e | 23/08/1975 | 25085 | Transfer out to: | HA | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 2w/e | 23/08/1975 | 25238 | Transfer out to: | HA | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 3w/e | 30/08/1975 | 25215 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 3w/e | 30/08/1975 | 25216 | Transfer in from: | HA | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 3w/e | 30/08/1975 | 25217 | Transfer in from: | HA | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 04/10/1975 | 08361 | Transfer in from: | 87B | Margam | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 04/10/1975 | 08586 | Transfer out to: | MG | Margam | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 11/10/1975 | 46016 | Transfer in from: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 11/10/1975 | 46017 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 11/10/1975 | 46018 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 11/10/1975 | 46019 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 11/10/1975 | 46052 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/10/1975 | 47140 | Transfer in from: | LE | Landore | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/10/1975 | 25029 | Transfer out to: | 91X | To Scottish Region | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/10/1975 | 25030 | Transfer out to: | 91X | To Scottish Region | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/10/1975 | 25031 | Transfer out to: | 91X | To Scottish Region | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/10/1975 | 25170 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/10/1975 | 25171 | Transfer out to: | HA | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/10/1975 | 25172 | Transfer out to: | HA | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/10/1975 | 25215 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/10/1975 | 25216 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/10/1975 | 25217 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/10/1975 | 47056 | Transfer out to: | OC | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/10/1975 | 47094 | Transfer out to: | CD | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/10/1975 | 47095 | Transfer out to: | CD | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 08/11/1975 | 25077 | Transfer in from: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 08/11/1975 | 25155 | Transfer in from: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 08/11/1975 | 25219 | Transfer in from: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 08/11/1975 | 25163 | Transfer out to: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 08/11/1975 | 25164 | Transfer out to: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 08/11/1975 | 25168 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 06/12/1975 | 37178 | Transfer in from: | 87A | Landore | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 06/12/1975 | 37290 | Transfer out to: | LE | Landore | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 10/01/1976 | 25063 | Transfer in from: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 10/01/1976 | 47054 | Transfer in from: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 10/01/1976 | 47055 | Transfer in from: | OC | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 10/01/1976 | 47056 | Transfer in from: | OC | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 10/01/1976 | 47131 | Transfer in from: | LE | Landore | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 10/01/1976 | 08364 | Transfer out to: | OC | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 10/01/1976 | 25165 | Transfer out to: | CD | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 10/01/1976 | 25167 | Transfer out to: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 06/03/1976 | 46016 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 06/03/1976 | 46017 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 08/05/1976 | 46011 | Transfer in from: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 08/05/1976 | 46012 | Transfer in from: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 08/05/1976 | 46013 | Transfer in from: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 08/05/1976 | 46014 | Transfer in from: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 08/05/1976 | 46015 | Transfer in from: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 08/05/1976 | 46016 | Transfer in from: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 08/05/1976 | 46017 | Transfer in from: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 08/05/1976 | 25166 | Transfer out to: | CD | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 08/05/1976 | 47151 | Transfer out to: | LE | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 08/05/1976 | 47152 | Transfer out to: | LE | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 19/06/1976 | 47056 | Transfer out to: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 10/07/1976 | 47074 | Transfer in from: | BS | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 10/07/1976 | 47249 | Transfer in from: | BS | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 10/07/1976 | 47095 | Transfer in from: | BS | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 07/08/1976 | 08664 | Transfer in from: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 07/08/1976 | 08850 | Transfer in from: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 07/08/1976 | 47317 | Transfer in from: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 07/08/1976 | 47318 | Transfer in from: | HA | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 07/08/1976 | 47074 | Transfer out to: | BS | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 07/08/1976 | 47249 | Transfer out to: | BS | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 10/1976 | 47002 | Transfer in from: | BS | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 10/1976 | 47143 | Transfer in from: | BS | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 10/1976 | 47144 | Transfer in from: | BS | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 10/1976 | 47145 | Transfer in from: | D02 | Birmingham Division | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 10/1976 | 08792 | Transfer out to: | LE | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 10/1976 | 47227 | Transfer out to: | CD | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 10/1976 | 47317 | Transfer out to: | BS | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 10/1976 | 47318 | Transfer out to: | BS | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 10/1976 | 47378 | Transfer out to: | BS | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 3w/e | 09/10/1976 | 37131 | Transfer in from: | TE | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 3w/e | 09/10/1976 | 37238 | Transfer in from: | GD | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 3w/e | 09/10/1976 | 37251 | Transfer in from: | 55C | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 3w/e | 09/10/1976 | 47020 | Transfer in from: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 3w/e | 09/10/1976 | 47024 | Transfer in from: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 3w/e | 09/10/1976 | 47056 | Transfer in from: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 3w/e | 09/10/1976 | 47059 | Transfer in from: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 3w/e | 09/10/1976 | 47068 | Transfer in from: | OC | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 3w/e | 09/10/1976 | 47076 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 3w/e | 09/10/1976 | 47077 | Transfer in from: | OC | |||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 3w/e | 09/10/1976 | 47078 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 3w/e | 09/10/1976 | 47079 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 3w/e | 09/10/1976 | 47080 | Transfer in from: | OC | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 3w/e | 09/10/1976 | 47081 | Transfer in from: | OC | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 3w/e | 09/10/1976 | 47086 | Transfer in from: | OC | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 3w/e | 09/10/1976 | 47087 | Transfer in from: | OC | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 3w/e | 09/10/1976 | 47088 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 3w/e | 09/10/1976 | 47089 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 3w/e | 09/10/1976 | 47090 | Transfer in from: | OC | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 3w/e | 09/10/1976 | 25032 | Transfer out to: | BS | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 3w/e | 09/10/1976 | 25063 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 3w/e | 09/10/1976 | 25077 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | 3w/e | 09/10/1976 | 46011 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | 3w/e | 09/10/1976 | 46012 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | 3w/e | 09/10/1976 | 46013 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | 3w/e | 09/10/1976 | 46014 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | 3w/e | 09/10/1976 | 46015 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | 3w/e | 09/10/1976 | 46016 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | 3w/e | 09/10/1976 | 46017 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | 3w/e | 09/10/1976 | 46047 | Transfer out to: | GD | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | 3w/e | 09/10/1976 | 46048 | Transfer out to: | GD | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | 3w/e | 09/10/1976 | 46049 | Transfer out to: | GD | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | 3w/e | 09/10/1976 | 46051 | Transfer out to: | GD | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | 3w/e | 09/10/1976 | 46052 | Transfer out to: | GD | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 27/11/1976 | 47378 | Transfer in from: | BS | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 27/11/1976 | 47229 | Transfer out to: | BS | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 11/12/1976 | 08822 | Transfer in from: | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/12/1976 | 25055 | Transfer in from: | CD | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 2w/e | 11/12/1976 | 25063 | Transfer in from: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 2w/e | 11/12/1976 | 25220 | Transfer in from: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 11/12/1976 | 46028 | Transfer in from: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/12/1976 | 25154 | Transfer out to: | CD | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 11/12/1976 | 46028 | Transfer out to: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 11/12/1976 | 47020 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 11/12/1976 | 47024 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | m/e | 01/1977 | 46028 | Transfer in from: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | m/e | 01/1977 | 46018 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | m/e | 01/1977 | 46028 | Transfer out to: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 01/1977 | 47095 | Transfer out to: | BS | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 01/1977 | 47143 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 01/1977 | 47144 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 01/1977 | 47145 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | m/e | 02/1977 | 37247 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | m/e | 02/1977 | 37268 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | m/e | 02/1977 | 37270 | Transfer in from: | 87A | Landore | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | m/e | 02/1977 | 37271 | Transfer in from: | LE | Landore | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | m/e | 02/1977 | 37131 | Transfer out to: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | m/e | 02/1977 | 37143 | Transfer out to: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | m/e | 02/1977 | 37298 | Transfer out to: | LE | Landore | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | m/e | 02/1977 | 37299 | Transfer out to: | LE | Landore | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | m/e | 02/1977 | 46019 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | m/e | 02/1977 | 46020 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 02/1977 | 47128 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 02/1977 | 47140 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 02/1977 | 47142 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 02/1977 | 47159 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 05/1977 | 08896 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 05/1977 | 47094 | Transfer in from: | CD | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 05/1977 | 47097 | Transfer in from: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 05/1977 | 47104 | Transfer in from: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 05/1977 | 47106 | Transfer in from: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 05/1977 | 47111 | Transfer in from: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 05/1977 | 47112 | Transfer in from: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 05/1977 | 08664 | Transfer out to: | LE | Landore | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | m/e | 05/1977 | 25155 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | m/e | 05/1977 | 46021 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | m/e | 05/1977 | 46022 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | m/e | 05/1977 | 46023 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | m/e | 05/1977 | 46024 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | m/e | 05/1977 | 46025 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | m/e | 05/1977 | 46026 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | m/e | 05/1977 | 46028 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 05/1977 | 47054 | Transfer out to: | LE | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 05/1977 | 47055 | Transfer out to: | LE | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 05/1977 | 47056 | Transfer out to: | LE | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 05/1977 | 47059 | Transfer out to: | LE | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 05/1977 | 47068 | Transfer out to: | LE | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 05/1977 | 47125 | Transfer out to: | LE | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 05/1977 | 47131 | Transfer out to: | LE | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 01/05/1977 | 47249 | Transfer in from: | BS | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 01/05/1977 | 47267 | Transfer in from: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 06/1977 | 47283 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 10/1977 | 47143 | Transfer in from: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 10/1977 | 47144 | Transfer in from: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 10/1977 | 47145 | Transfer in from: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 10/1977 | 08480 | Transfer out to: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 10/1977 | 08594 | Transfer out to: | EJ | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | m/e | 10/1977 | 37295 | Transfer out to: | LE | Landore | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | m/e | 10/1977 | 37296 | Transfer out to: | LE | Landore | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | m/e | 10/1977 | 37297 | Transfer out to: | LE | Landore | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 3w/e | 20/11/1977 | 25055 | Transfer out to: | CD | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 3w/e | 20/11/1977 | 25063 | Transfer out to: | CD | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 3w/e | 20/11/1977 | 25219 | Transfer out to: | CD | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 3w/e | 20/11/1977 | 25220 | Transfer out to: | CD | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 09/01/1978 | 08361 | Transfer out to: | EJ | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 03/1978 | 47128 | Transfer in from: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 03/1978 | 08822 | Transfer out to: | EJ | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 6w/e | 13/05/1978 | 08779 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 11/1978 | 08835 | Transfer in from: | RG | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 11/1978 | 47029 | Transfer in from: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 11/1978 | 47030 | Transfer in from: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 11/1978 | 47033 | Transfer in from: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 11/1978 | 08850 | Transfer out to: | RG | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 30/11/1979 | 47901 | Transfer in from: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | m/e | 07/1980 | 37234 | Transfer in from: | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 12/10/1980 | 08190 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 09/11/1980 | 08194 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/12/1980 | 08198 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 08/12/1980 | 08787 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 08/12/1980 | 08592 | Transfer out to: | LE | Landore | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 31/12/1980 | 08192 | To Store | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 31/12/1980 | 08196 | To Store | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 05/01/1981 | 47254 | Transfer out to: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 31/05/1981 | 08792 | Transfer in from: | LE | Landore | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 07/1981 | 08804 | Transfer in from: | SW | Swindon | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | m/e | 07/1981 | 37289 | Transfer in from: | LE | Landore | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | m/e | 07/1981 | 37290 | Transfer in from: | LE | Landore | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | m/e | 07/1981 | 37294 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | m/e | 07/1981 | 37294 | Transfer out to: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 05/07/1981 | 08353 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | m/e | 09/1981 | 37292 | Transfer out to: | ML | Motherwell | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 09/1981 | 47002 | Transfer out to: | HA | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 11/1981 | 08796 | Transfer in from: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 11/1981 | 47068 | Transfer in from: | LE | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 11/1981 | 47075 | Transfer in from: | LE | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 11/1981 | 47082 | Transfer in from: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 11/1981 | 47082 | Transfer out to: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 06/12/1981 | 08189 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 24/04/1983 | 08188 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 10/07/1983 | 08193 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 10/07/1983 | 08352 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 24/07/1983 | 08187 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 31/07/1983 | 08349 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 25/09/1983 | 08195 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 17/01/1984 | 08350 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 17/01/1984 | 08351 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 29/04/1984 | 46032 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 29/09/1985 | 08491 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 28/02/1986 | 47111 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 10/07/1986 | 08354 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 14/01/1987 | 47230 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 10/05/1987 | 45105 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 21/06/1987 | 47089 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 14/07/1987 | 47103 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 03/09/1987 | 47122 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 04/10/1987 | 08493 | Transfer in from: | FP | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 47033 | Transfer in from: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 47063 | Transfer in from: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 47079 | Transfer in from: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 47085 | Transfer in from: | SF | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 47094 | Transfer in from: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 47256 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 47295 | Transfer in from: | GD | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 47326 | Transfer in from: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 47327 | Transfer in from: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 47901 | Transfer in from: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 56 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 56001 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Diesel | 56 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 56031 | Transfer in from: | TO | Toton | ||
Diesel | 56 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 56033 | Transfer in from: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 56 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 56034 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Diesel | 56 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 56036 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Diesel | 56 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 56039 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Diesel | 56 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 56043 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Diesel | 56 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 56045 | Transfer in from: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 56 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 56046 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Diesel | 56 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 56048 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Diesel | 56 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 56049 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Diesel | 56 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 56051 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Diesel | 56 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 56055 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Diesel | 56 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 56056 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Diesel | 56 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 56057 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 37175 | Transfer out to: | IS | Inverness | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 37251 | Transfer out to: | IS | Inverness | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 37285 | Transfer out to: | IS | Inverness | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 47033 | Transfer out to: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 47079 | Transfer out to: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 47094 | Transfer out to: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 47098 | Transfer out to: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 47143 | Transfer out to: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 47144 | Transfer out to: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 47235 | Transfer out to: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 47249 | Transfer out to: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 47256 | Transfer out to: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 47589 | Transfer out to: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 47592 | Transfer out to: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 47600 | Transfer out to: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 47603 | Transfer out to: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 47616 | Transfer out to: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 47624 | Transfer out to: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 47625 | Transfer out to: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 47626 | Transfer out to: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 47901 | Transfer out to: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 11/10/1987 | 08779 | Transfer out to: | SF | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 21/12/1987 | 08400 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 20/01/1988 | 08191 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 29/02/1988 | 47106 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 05/05/1988 | 37102 | Transfer in from: | MR | March | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 05/05/1988 | 47104 | Transfer out to: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 37024 | Transfer in from: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 37052 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 37078 | Transfer in from: | TE | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 37084 | Transfer in from: | MR | March | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 37102 | Transfer in from: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 37142 | Transfer in from: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 37146 | Transfer in from: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 37147 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 37158 | Transfer in from: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 37174 | Transfer in from: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 37176 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 37177 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 37180 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 37207 | Transfer in from: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 37215 | Transfer in from: | SF | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 37232 | Transfer in from: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 37263 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 37264 | Transfer in from: | LE | Landore | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 37889 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 47359 | Transfer in from: | TO | Toton | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 37102 | Transfer out to: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 37176 | Transfer out to: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 37668 | Transfer out to: | TE | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 47377 | Transfer out to: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 47378 | Transfer out to: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 47602 | Transfer out to: | CD | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 47606 | Transfer out to: | CD | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 47609 | Transfer out to: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 47611 | Transfer out to: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 47612 | Transfer out to: | CD | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 47613 | Transfer out to: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 47618 | Transfer out to: | CD | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 47620 | Transfer out to: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 47632 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 47650 | Transfer out to: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 47653 | Transfer out to: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 47655 | Transfer out to: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 47656 | Transfer out to: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 47657 | Transfer out to: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 47659 | Transfer out to: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 47663 | Transfer out to: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 47665 | Transfer out to: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 09 | 0-6-0 | on | 29/05/1988 | 09008 | Transfer in from: | 73F | Ashford Chart Leacon | ||
Diesel | 09 | 0-6-0 | on | 29/05/1988 | 09013 | Transfer in from: | 73F | Ashford Chart Leacon | ||
Diesel | 56 | Co-Co | on | 05/06/1988 | 56072 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Diesel | 56 | Co-Co | on | 05/06/1988 | 56074 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Diesel | 56 | Co-Co | on | 05/06/1988 | 56075 | Transfer in from: | GD | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 12/06/1988 | 08660 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 12/06/1988 | 08663 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 12/06/1988 | 47197 | Transfer in from: | CD | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 12/06/1988 | 47198 | Transfer in from: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 12/06/1988 | 47085 | Transfer out to: | CD | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 26/07/1988 | 08760 | Reinstated | 98S | |||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 04/09/1988 | 37211 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 04/09/1988 | 37218 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 04/09/1988 | 08663 | Transfer out to: | BZ | St Blazey | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 04/09/1988 | 37218 | Transfer out to: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 04/09/1988 | 37229 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 56 | Co-Co | on | 04/09/1988 | 56074 | Transfer out to: | TD | |||
Diesel | 56 | Co-Co | on | 04/09/1988 | 56075 | Transfer out to: | TO | Toton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 07/09/1988 | 08940 | Reinstated | 98S | |||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 13/03/1989 | 47101 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 20/04/1989 | 47198 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 05/06/1989 | 47124 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 01/02/1990 | 47645 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 01/02/1990 | 47901 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/04/1990 | 47097 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 04/05/1990 | 08796 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 01/11/1990 | 47633 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 60 | Co-Co | on | 12/12/1990 | 60026 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 60 | Co-Co | on | 21/01/1991 | 60010 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/02/1991 | 47233 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 14/02/1991 | 08787 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 60 | Co-Co | on | 22/02/1991 | 60033 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 60 | Co-Co | on | 10/04/1991 | 60051 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 60 | Co-Co | on | 03/05/1991 | 60054 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 60 | Co-Co | on | 09/05/1991 | 60039 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 60 | Co-Co | on | 13/06/1991 | 60063 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 60 | Co-Co | on | 17/06/1991 | 60062 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 07/07/1991 | 47123 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 60 | Co-Co | on | 17/09/1991 | 60065 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 27/09/1991 | 37410 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 08/11/1991 | 08660 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 12/11/1991 | 47099 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 22/11/1991 | 47112 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 60 | Co-Co | on | 08/01/1992 | 60089 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 60 | Co-Co | on | 17/01/1992 | 60079 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 14/02/1992 | 08760 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 24/02/1992 | 47094 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1992 | 47119 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 24/11/1992 | 08589 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 19/02/1993 | 47327 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 16/07/1993 | 37215 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 01/10/1993 | 37381 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 13/12/1993 | 47105 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 15/10/1994 | 37280 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 22/09/1995 | 47063 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 22/09/1995 | 47096 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 19/05/1996 | 37138 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 56 | Co-Co | on | 18/09/1996 | 56001 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 24/09/1996 | 47121 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 01/05/1997 | 37142 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 01/05/1997 | 47628 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 01/08/1997 | 37699 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 28/01/1998 | 47359 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 01/12/1998 | 37332 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 01/01/1999 | 37275 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 28/01/1999 | 47256 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 31/01/1999 | 37254 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 01/02/1999 | 37404 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 01/04/1999 | 37431 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 01/04/1999 | 37697 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 01/06/1999 | 37889 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 01/11/1999 | 37371 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 01/12/1999 | 37264 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 01/03/2000 | 37414 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 01/03/2000 | 37424 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 01/03/2000 | 37713 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 01/03/2000 | 47636 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 01/12/2000 | 37413 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 01/12/2000 | 37678 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 05/10/2001 | 47238 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 01/04/2002 | 37885 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 56 | Co-Co | on | 07/2002 | 56046 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 56 | Co-Co | on | 08/2002 | 56048 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 31/01/2003 | 08940 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 31/01/2003 | 37223 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 31/01/2003 | 47295 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 56 | Co-Co | on | 03/2003 | 56055 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 23/04/2003 | 37213 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 16/05/2003 | 37278 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 01/07/2003 | 47641 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 31/08/2003 | 37211 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 56 | Co-Co | on | 10/2003 | 56033 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 01/10/2003 | 47644 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 56 | Co-Co | on | 01/2004 | 56039 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 31/01/2004 | 37078 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 31/01/2004 | 37227 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 31/01/2004 | 37263 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 56 | Co-Co | on | 02/2004 | 56056 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 56 | Co-Co | on | 02/2004 | 56072 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/02/2004 | 08896 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 01/02/2004 | 47635 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 28/02/2004 | 37225 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 31/08/2004 | 47283 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 30/09/2004 | 47258 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 01/04/2005 | 37418 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 56 | Co-Co | on | 06/2005 | 56034 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 56 | Co-Co | on | 06/2005 | 56036 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 30/06/2005 | 37162 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 30/06/2005 | 37185 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 30/06/2005 | 47241 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 01/08/2005 | 37408 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 31/08/2005 | 37220 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 31/08/2005 | 37230 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 31/05/2006 | 47236 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 31/08/2006 | 47326 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 01/02/2007 | 47145 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 28/02/2007 | 08792 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 28/02/2007 | 37146 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 28/02/2007 | 47186 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 28/02/2007 | 47197 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 28/02/2007 | 47226 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 31/10/2007 | 37174 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 31/12/2007 | 47033 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 30/04/2008 | 37158 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/06/2008 | 08493 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 31/07/2008 | 37222 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 56 | Co-Co | on | 09/2008 | 56043 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 30/09/2008 | 37238 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 30/09/2008 | 37293 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 30/09/2008 | 37294 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 01/02/2009 | 37248 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 56 | Co-Co | on | 04/2009 | 56301 | Condemned |