Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 106 Today
» 1237 Yesterday
» 1343 Week
» 3925 Month
» 268558 Year
» 1490123 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Aintree


Type Class Wheels Period Date Number Event Code Depot Length of Stay Notes
Steam 5 2-4-2T 01/01/1948 10648 Snapshot        
Steam 5 2-4-2T 01/01/1948 10655 Snapshot        
Steam 5 2-4-2T 01/01/1948 10660 Snapshot        
Steam 23 0-6-0ST 01/01/1948 11343 Snapshot        
Steam 23 0-6-0ST 01/01/1948 11413 Snapshot        
Steam 23 0-6-0ST 01/01/1948 11460 Snapshot        
Steam 23 0-6-0ST 01/01/1948 11462 Snapshot        
Steam 23 0-6-0ST 01/01/1948 11530 Snapshot        
Steam 24 0-6-0T 01/01/1948 11544 Snapshot        
Steam 27 0-6-0 01/01/1948 12094 Snapshot        
Steam 27 0-6-0 01/01/1948 12112 Snapshot        
Steam 27 0-6-0 01/01/1948 12179 Snapshot        
Steam 27 0-6-0 01/01/1948 12196 Snapshot        
Steam 27 0-6-0 01/01/1948 12218 Snapshot        
Steam 27 0-6-0 01/01/1948 12328 Snapshot        
Steam 27 0-6-0 01/01/1948 12333 Snapshot        
Steam 27 0-6-0 01/01/1948 12362 Snapshot        
Steam 27 0-6-0 01/01/1948 12379 Snapshot        
Steam 27 0-6-0 01/01/1948 12390 Snapshot        
Steam 27 0-6-0 01/01/1948 12405 Snapshot        
Steam 27 0-6-0 01/01/1948 12456 Snapshot        
Steam 27 0-6-0 01/01/1948 12527 Snapshot        
Steam 28 0-6-0 01/01/1948 12557 Snapshot        
Steam 28 0-6-0 01/01/1948 12582 Snapshot        
Steam 30 0-8-0 01/01/1948 12782 Snapshot        
Steam 31 0-8-0 01/01/1948 12856 Snapshot        
Steam 31 0-8-0 01/01/1948 12857 Snapshot        
Steam 31 0-8-0 01/01/1948 12870 Snapshot        
Steam 31 0-8-0 01/01/1948 12910 Snapshot        
Steam 31 0-8-0 01/01/1948 12956 Snapshot        
Steam 31 0-8-0 01/01/1948 12962 Snapshot        
Steam 4F 0-6-0 01/01/1948 4220 Snapshot        
Steam 4F 0-6-0 01/01/1948 4462 Snapshot        
Steam 4F 0-6-0 01/01/1948 4481 Snapshot        
Steam 4F 0-6-0 01/01/1948 4541 Snapshot        
Steam 23 0-6-0ST 01/01/1948 51475 Snapshot        
Steam 27 0-6-0 01/01/1948 52337 Snapshot        
Steam 27 0-6-0 01/01/1948 52401 Snapshot        
Steam 31 0-8-0 01/01/1948 52877 Snapshot        
Steam 31 0-8-0 01/01/1948 52935 Snapshot        
Steam 31 0-8-0 01/01/1948 52971 Snapshot        
Steam 8F 2-8-0 01/01/1948 8385 Snapshot        
Steam 8F 2-8-0 01/01/1948 8461 Snapshot        
Steam 8F 2-8-0 01/01/1948 8469 Snapshot        
Steam 8F 2-8-0 01/01/1948 8706 Snapshot        
Steam 8F 2-8-0 01/01/1948 8707 Snapshot        
Steam 7F 0-8-0 01/01/1948 9521 Snapshot        
Steam 7F 0-8-0 01/01/1948 9535 Snapshot        
Steam 7F 0-8-0 01/01/1948 9564 Snapshot        
Steam 7F 0-8-0 01/01/1948 9566 Snapshot        
Steam 7F 0-8-0 01/01/1948 9567 Snapshot        
Steam 7F 0-8-0 01/01/1948 9571 Snapshot        
Steam 7F 0-8-0 01/01/1948 9581 Snapshot        
Steam 7F 0-8-0 01/01/1948 9586 Snapshot        
Steam 7F 0-8-0 01/01/1948 9587 Snapshot        
Steam 7F 0-8-0 01/01/1948 9592 Snapshot        
Steam 7F 0-8-0 01/01/1948 9595 Snapshot        
Steam 7F 0-8-0 01/01/1948 9597 Snapshot        
Steam 7F 0-8-0 01/01/1948 9613 Snapshot        
Steam 27 0-6-0 24/01/1948 52401 Condemned      
Steam 27 0-6-0 20/03/1948 52337 Condemned      
Steam 31 0-8-0 26/06/1948 52935 Condemned      
Steam 31 0-8-0 02/10/1948 52877 Condemned      
Steam 7F 0-8-0 m/e 04/1949 49521 Condemned      
Steam 7F 0-8-0 m/e 05/1949 49597 Condemned      
Steam 7F 0-8-0 w/e 11/06/1949 49581 Condemned      
Steam 7F 0-8-0 m/e 07/1949 49613 Condemned      
Steam 27 0-6-0 5w/e 16/07/1949 52390 Transfer out to: 23D Wigan Central (L&Y)    
Steam 31 0-8-0 4w/e 16/07/1949 52971 Condemned      
Steam 7F 0-8-0 w/e 24/09/1949 49564 Condemned      
Steam 23 0-6-0ST m/e 11/1949 51475 Condemned      
Steam 7F 0-8-0 5w/e 24/12/1949 49641 Transfer in from: 26C Bolton    
Steam 7F 0-8-0 5w/e 24/12/1949 49643 Transfer in from: 25A Wakefield    
Steam 28 0-6-0 5w/e 24/12/1949 52582 Transfer out to: 23C Southport    
Steam 7F 0-8-0 31/12/1949 49643 Condemned      
Steam 7F 0-8-0 3w/e 14/01/1950 49665 Transfer in from: 26D Bury    
Steam 27 0-6-0 3w/e 14/01/1950 52461 Transfer in from: 26B Agecroft    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 3w/e 14/01/1950 48706 Transfer out to: NTH Northwich    
Steam 31 0-8-0 2w/e 14/01/1950 52956 Condemned      
Steam 7F 0-8-0 19/01/1950 49567 Condemned      
Steam 31 0-8-0 w/e 06/05/1950 52856 Condemned      
Steam 7F 0-8-0 2w/e 17/06/1950 49631 Transfer in from: 26B Agecroft    
Steam 7F 0-8-0 2w/e 17/06/1950 49635 Transfer in from: 25A Wakefield    
Steam 31 0-8-0 2w/e 17/06/1950 52870 Transfer out to: 27D Wigan Central (L&Y)    
Steam 31 0-8-0 w/e 01/07/1950 52962 Condemned      
Steam 7F 0-8-0 14/08/1950 49665 Condemned      
Steam 30 0-8-0 w/e 02/09/1950 52782 Condemned      
Steam 7F 0-8-0 4w/e 09/09/1950 49603 Transfer in from: 25A Wakefield    
Steam 7F 0-8-0 4w/e 09/09/1950 49617 Transfer in from: 24C Lostock Hall    
Steam 31 0-8-0 w/e 30/09/1950 52910 Condemned      
Steam 7F 0-8-0 27/10/1950 49635 Condemned      
Steam 5 2-4-2T 4w/e 04/11/1950 50660 Transfer out to: 26E Bacup    
Steam 27 0-6-0 4w/e 04/11/1950 52328 Transfer out to: 26D Bury    
Steam 27 0-6-0 4w/e 04/11/1950 52333 Transfer out to: 26B Agecroft    
Steam 7F 0-8-0 11/11/1950 49535 Condemned      
Steam 7F 0-8-0 18/11/1950 49641 Condemned      
Steam 7F 0-8-0 4w/e 02/12/1950 49545 Transfer in from: 25A Wakefield    
Steam 7F 0-8-0 4w/e 02/12/1950 49554 Transfer in from: 26A Newton Heath    
Steam Crab 2-6-0 4w/e 31/12/1950 42726 Transfer in from: 25F Low Moor    
Steam Crab 2-6-0 4w/e 31/12/1950 42727 Transfer in from: 25F Low Moor    
Steam Crab 2-6-0 4w/e 31/12/1950 42728 Transfer in from: 25F Low Moor    
Steam 7F 0-8-0 4w/e 31/12/1950 49510 Transfer in from: 26A Newton Heath    
Steam 7F 0-8-0 4w/e 31/12/1950 49640 Transfer in from: 24C Lostock Hall    
Steam 7F 0-8-0 4w/e 31/12/1950 49672 Transfer in from: 25G Farnley Junction    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 31/12/1950 44220 Transfer out to: 24D Lower Darwen    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 31/12/1950 44462 Transfer out to: 25D Mirfield    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 31/12/1950 44481 Transfer out to: 27E Walton on the Hill    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 31/12/1950 44541 Transfer out to: 27E Walton on the Hill    
Steam 5 2-4-2T 4w/e 27/01/1951 50646 Transfer in from: 26C Bolton    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 31/01/1951 48707 Transfer out to: 84G Shrewsbury    
Steam 7F 0-8-0 4w/e 24/02/1951 49589 Transfer in from: 25A Wakefield    
Steam 5 2-4-2T 4w/e 24/02/1951 50652 Transfer in from: 26E Bacup    
Steam 7F 0-8-0 4w/e 24/02/1951 49592 Transfer out to: 27D Wigan Central (L&Y)    
Steam 24 0-6-0T 4w/e 24/03/1951 11537 Transfer in from: 23A Bank Hall    
Steam 27 0-6-0 4w/e 24/03/1951 52171 Transfer in from: 24C Lostock Hall    
Steam 5 2-4-2T 4w/e 24/03/1951 50646 Transfer out to: 26C Bolton    
Steam 5 2-4-2T 4w/e 24/03/1951 50652 Transfer out to: 26E Bacup    
Steam 7F 0-8-0 28/04/1951 49631 Condemned      
Steam 5 2-4-2T 4w/e 19/05/1951 50652 Transfer in from: 26E Bacup    
Steam 7F 0-8-0 02/06/1951 49571 Condemned      
Steam 7F 0-8-0 09/06/1951 49589 Condemned      
Steam 5 2-4-2T 4w/e 16/06/1951 50651 Transfer in from: 26D Bury    
Steam 5 2-4-2T 4w/e 16/06/1951 50829 Transfer in from: 26D Bury    
Steam 28 0-6-0 4w/e 16/06/1951 52615 Transfer in from: 26D Bury    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 16/06/1951 79226 Transfer in from: 24B Rose Grove    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 16/06/1951 90127 Transfer in from:        
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 16/06/1951 90142 Transfer in from:        
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 16/06/1951 90234 Transfer in from:        
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 16/06/1951 90390 Transfer in from: 26A Newton Heath    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 16/06/1951 90408 Transfer in from:        
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 16/06/1951 90570 Transfer in from:        
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 16/06/1951 90604 Transfer in from:        
Steam 5 2-4-2T 4w/e 16/06/1951 50652 Transfer out to: 24B Rose Grove    
Steam 5 2-4-2T 4w/e 16/06/1951 50655 Transfer out to: 26D Bury    
Steam 7F 0-8-0 16/06/1951 49587 Condemned      
Steam 7F 0-8-0 16/06/1951 49617 Condemned      
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 17/07/1951 90164 Transfer in from:        
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 17/07/1951 90247 Transfer in from: 73C Hither Green    
Steam 27 0-6-0 4w/e 17/07/1951 52527 Transfer out to: 24B Rose Grove    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 11/08/1951 41283 Transfer in from: 25A Wakefield    
Steam 7F 0-8-0 4w/e 11/08/1951 49511 Transfer in from: 27D Wigan Central (L&Y)    
Steam 7F 0-8-0 4w/e 11/08/1951 49592 Transfer in from: 27D Wigan Central (L&Y)    
Steam 7F 0-8-0 4w/e 11/08/1951 49659 Transfer in from: 27D Wigan Central (L&Y)    
Steam 7F 0-8-0 4w/e 11/08/1951 49664 Transfer in from: 27D Wigan Central (L&Y)    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 11/08/1951 90671 Transfer in from:        
Steam 5 2-4-2T 4w/e 11/08/1951 50651 Transfer out to: 26D Bury    
Steam 27 0-6-0 4w/e 11/08/1951 52405 Transfer out to: 27A Bank Hall    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 11/08/1951 90127 Transfer out to: 25A Wakefield    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 11/08/1951 90142 Transfer out to: 25A Wakefield    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 11/08/1951 90164 Transfer out to: 25A Wakefield    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 11/08/1951 90234 Transfer out to: 25A Wakefield    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 11/08/1951 90247 Transfer out to: 25A Wakefield    
Steam Crab 2-6-0 4w/e 08/09/1951 42732 Transfer in from: 25F Low Moor    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 08/09/1951 90121 Transfer in from:        
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 08/09/1951 90282 Transfer in from:        
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 08/09/1951 48469 Transfer out to: 20C Royston    
Steam 5 2-4-2T 4w/e 08/09/1951 50829 Transfer out to: 26E Bacup    
Steam 7F 0-8-0 08/09/1951 49510 Condemned      
Steam 27 0-6-0 w/e 08/09/1951 52112 Condemned      
Steam 28 0-6-0 w/e 29/09/1951 52557 Condemned      
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 06/10/1951 41284 Transfer in from: 25A Wakefield    
Steam 27 0-6-0 4w/e 06/10/1951 52378 Transfer in from: 26F Lees (Oldham)    
Steam 7F 0-8-0 4w/e 06/10/1951 49592 Transfer out to: 27D Wigan Central (L&Y)    
Steam 5 2-4-2T 4w/e 06/10/1951 50648 Transfer out to: 26C Bolton    
Steam 27 0-6-0 4w/e 06/10/1951 52196 Transfer out to: 10E Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 06/10/1951 90390 Transfer out to: 25E Sowerby Bridge    
Steam 7F 0-8-0 08/12/1951 49595 Condemned      
Steam 31 0-8-0 w/e 22/12/1951 52857 Condemned      
Steam 27 0-6-0 4w/e 29/12/1951 52416 Transfer in from: 26F Lees (Oldham)    
Steam 27 0-6-0 4w/e 29/12/1951 52464 Transfer in from: 26F Lees (Oldham)    
Steam 28 0-6-0 4w/e 29/12/1951 52615 Transfer out to: 26F Lees (Oldham)    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 23/02/1952 90267 Transfer in from: 25G Farnley Junction    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 23/02/1952 90278 Transfer in from: 25G Farnley Junction    
Steam 7F 0-8-0 4w/e 23/02/1952 49603 Transfer out to: 26B Agecroft    
Steam 23 0-6-0ST 4w/e 22/03/1952 51307 Transfer in from: 23A Bank Hall    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 22/03/1952 90216 Transfer in from: 26B Agecroft    
Steam 7F 0-8-0 4w/e 22/03/1952 49511 Transfer out to: 27D Wigan Central (L&Y)    
Steam 24 0-6-0T 4w/e 19/04/1952 51535 Transfer in from: 23A Bank Hall    
Steam 23 0-6-0ST 4w/e 19/04/1952 51307 Transfer out to: 27A Bank Hall    
Steam 27 0-6-0 8w/e 14/06/1952 52179 Transfer out to: 26D Bury    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 8w/e 14/06/1952 90408 Transfer out to: 26D Bury    
Steam 27 0-6-0 4w/e 04/10/1952 52136 Transfer in from: 26A Newton Heath    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 04/10/1952 90267 Transfer out to: 24B Rose Grove    
Steam 27 0-6-0 w/e 15/11/1952 52362 Condemned      
Steam 27 0-6-0 8w/e 29/11/1952 52278 Transfer in from: 23C Southport    
Steam 27 0-6-0 8w/e 29/11/1952 52299 Transfer in from: 24D Lower Darwen    
Steam 27 0-6-0 3w/e 24/01/1953 52095 Transfer in from: 20D Normanton    
Steam 27 0-6-0 3w/e 24/01/1953 52135 Transfer in from: 16A Nottingham    
Steam 27 0-6-0 3w/e 24/01/1953 52258 Transfer in from: 20C Royston    
Steam 27 0-6-0 3w/e 24/01/1953 52311 Transfer in from: 24D Lower Darwen    
Steam Crab 2-6-0 4w/e 21/02/1953 42733 Transfer in from: 24A Accrington    
Steam 27 0-6-0 4w/e 21/02/1953 52095 Transfer in from: 27B Aintree    
Steam 27 0-6-0 4w/e 21/02/1953 52135 Transfer in from: 27B Aintree    
Steam 27 0-6-0 4w/e 21/02/1953 52258 Transfer in from: 27B Aintree    
Steam 27 0-6-0 4w/e 21/02/1953 52095 Transfer out to: 27B Aintree    
Steam 27 0-6-0 4w/e 21/02/1953 52135 Transfer out to: 27B Aintree    
Steam 27 0-6-0 4w/e 21/02/1953 52258 Transfer out to: 27B Aintree    
Steam 27 0-6-0 4w/e 21/02/1953 52464 Transfer out to: Crewe Works    
Steam 27 0-6-0 4w/e 21/03/1953 52095 Transfer out to: 27D Wigan Central (L&Y)    
Steam 27 0-6-0 4w/e 16/05/1953 52094 Transfer out to: 26D Bury    
Steam 27 0-6-0 4w/e 08/08/1953 52218 Transfer out to: Crewe Works    
Steam 7F 0-8-0 4w/e 05/09/1953 49620 Transfer in from: 25E Sowerby Bridge    
Steam 7F 0-8-0 4w/e 05/09/1953 49650 Transfer in from:        
Steam 7F 0-8-0 4w/e 03/10/1953 49554 Transfer out to: 27D Wigan Central (L&Y)    
Steam Compound 4-4-0 4w/e 31/10/1953 41102 Transfer in from: 27C Southport    
Steam Compound 4-4-0 4w/e 31/10/1953 41186 Transfer in from: 27E Walton on the Hill    
Steam Compound 4-4-0 4w/e 31/10/1953 41187 Transfer in from: 27E Walton on the Hill    
Steam Compound 4-4-0 4w/e 31/10/1953 41188 Transfer in from: 27E Walton on the Hill    
Steam 7F 0-8-0 4w/e 28/11/1953 49554 Transfer in from: 27D Wigan Central (L&Y)    
Steam 7F 0-8-0 4w/e 28/11/1953 49637 Transfer in from: 27D Wigan Central (L&Y)    
Steam 7F 0-8-0 4w/e 28/11/1953 49638 Transfer in from: 27D Wigan Central (L&Y)    
Steam Crab 2-6-0 4w/e 28/11/1953 42733 Transfer out to: 62A Thornton Junction    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 28/11/1953 90121 Transfer out to: 27D Wigan Central (L&Y)    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 28/11/1953 90570 Transfer out to: 27D Wigan Central (L&Y)    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 28/11/1953 90671 Transfer out to: 27D Wigan Central (L&Y)    
Steam 5 2-4-2T 4w/e 30/01/1954 50648 Transfer in from: 24B Rose Grove    
Steam 1008 2-4-2T 4w/e 30/01/1954 50648 Transfer in from: 24B Rose Grove    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 27/03/1954 90375 Transfer in from: 25D Mirfield    
Steam 7F 0-8-0 4w/e 27/03/1954 49554 Transfer out to: 25E Sowerby Bridge    
Steam 5 2-4-2T 4w/e 27/03/1954 50648 Transfer out to: 24B Rose Grove    
Steam 1008 2-4-2T 4w/e 27/03/1954 50648 Transfer out to: 24B Rose Grove    
Steam Crab 2-6-0 4w/e 24/04/1954 42733 Transfer in from: 62B Dundee Tay Bridge    
Steam Compound 4-4-0 4w/e 24/04/1954 41102 Transfer out to: 25G Farnley Junction    
Steam Compound 4-4-0 4w/e 24/04/1954 41186 Transfer out to: 25F Low Moor    
Steam Compound 4-4-0 4w/e 24/04/1954 41187 Transfer out to: 25F Low Moor    
Steam Compound 4-4-0 4w/e 24/04/1954 41188 Transfer out to: 25G Farnley Junction    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 8w/e 19/06/1954 90101 Transfer in from: 26A Newton Heath    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 8w/e 19/06/1954 90127 Transfer in from: 25A Wakefield    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 8w/e 19/06/1954 90141 Transfer in from: 25A Wakefield    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 8w/e 19/06/1954 90142 Transfer in from: 25A Wakefield    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 8w/e 19/06/1954 90164 Transfer in from: 25A Wakefield    
Steam Crab 2-6-0 8w/e 19/06/1954 42726 Transfer out to: 26A Newton Heath    
Steam Crab 2-6-0 8w/e 19/06/1954 42727 Transfer out to: 26A Newton Heath    
Steam Crab 2-6-0 8w/e 19/06/1954 42728 Transfer out to: 26A Newton Heath    
Steam Crab 2-6-0 8w/e 19/06/1954 42732 Transfer out to: 26A Newton Heath    
Steam Crab 2-6-0 8w/e 19/06/1954 42733 Transfer out to: 26A Newton Heath    
Steam 24 0-6-0T 8w/e 19/06/1954 51544 Transfer out to: 27A Bank Hall    
Steam 27 0-6-0 07/08/1954 52258 Condemned      
Steam 7F 0-8-0 4w/e 14/08/1954 49511 Transfer in from: 25E Sowerby Bridge    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 14/08/1954 90107 Transfer in from: 25D Mirfield    
Steam 27 0-6-0 04/09/1954 52299 Condemned      
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 25/09/1954 90643 Transfer in from: 25A Wakefield    
Steam 23 0-6-0ST m/e 10/1954 51460 Condemned      
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 4w/e 09/10/1954 46412 Transfer in from: 26B Agecroft    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 4w/e 09/10/1954 46439 Transfer in from:        
Steam 7F 0-8-0 4w/e 09/10/1954 49637 Transfer in from: 27B Aintree    
Steam 7F 0-8-0 4w/e 09/10/1954 49638 Transfer in from: 27B Aintree    
Steam 7F 0-8-0 4w/e 09/10/1954 49637 Transfer out to: 27B Aintree    
Steam 7F 0-8-0 4w/e 09/10/1954 49638 Transfer out to: 27B Aintree    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 01/01/1955 90204 Transfer in from: 26G Belle Vue    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 01/01/1955 90416 Transfer in from: 26C Bolton    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 26/02/1955 90142 Transfer out to: 26G Belle Vue    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 23/04/1955 90343 Transfer in from: 26C Bolton    
Steam 27 0-6-0 m/e 07/1955 52416 Condemned      
Steam 27 0-6-0 4w/e 05/11/1955 52461 Transfer out to: 26C Bolton    
Steam 23 0-6-0ST w/e 26/11/1955 51530 Condemned      
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 03/12/1955 90535 Transfer in from: 26A Newton Heath    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 03/12/1955 90675 Transfer in from: 26A Newton Heath    
Steam 7F 0-8-0 4w/e 03/12/1955 49511 Transfer out to: 26A Newton Heath    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 31/12/1955 90724 Transfer in from: 25A Wakefield    
Steam 7F 0-8-0 28/01/1956 49620 Condemned      
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 25/02/1956 90381 Transfer in from:        
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 21/04/1956 90527 Transfer in from: 25G Farnley Junction    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 21/04/1956 48461 Transfer out to: 82B St Philips Marsh    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 21/04/1956 90127 Transfer out to: 25G Farnley Junction    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 m/e 16/06/1956 46405 Transfer in from: 23A Bank Hall    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 m/e 16/06/1956 90234 Transfer in from: 25A Wakefield    
Steam 7F 0-8-0 23/06/1956 49638 Condemned      
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 11/08/1956 90283 Transfer in from: 26A Newton Heath    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 11/08/1956 90712 Transfer in from: 26C Bolton    
Steam 24 0-6-0T w/e 01/09/1956 51535 Condemned      
Steam 23 0-6-0ST 27/10/1956 51462 Condemned      
Steam 23 0-6-0ST 4w/e 03/11/1956 51397 Transfer in from: 8C Speke Junction    
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 4w/e 01/12/1956 78043 Transfer in from: 27A Bank Hall    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 01/12/1956 41283 Transfer out to: 27A Bank Hall    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 01/12/1956 41284 Transfer out to: 27A Bank Hall    
Steam 27 0-6-0 4w/e 01/12/1956 52278 Transfer out to: 26A Newton Heath    
Steam 23 0-6-0ST 4w/e 26/01/1957 51397 Transfer out to: 6E Wrexham Rhosddu    
Steam 7F 0-8-0 16/02/1957 49664 Condemned      
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 4w/e 23/02/1957 47305 Transfer in from: 26A Newton Heath    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 4w/e 23/02/1957 47425 Transfer in from: 26A Newton Heath    
Steam 23 0-6-0ST 4w/e 23/02/1957 51343 Transfer out to: 26A Newton Heath    
Steam 7F 0-8-0 02/03/1957 49659 Condemned      
Steam 7F 0-8-0 09/03/1957 49672 Condemned      
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 23/03/1957 41283 Transfer in from: 27A Bank Hall    
Steam Crab 2-6-0 4w/e 23/03/1957 42711 Transfer in from: 26A Newton Heath    
Steam Crab 2-6-0 4w/e 23/03/1957 42721 Transfer in from: 26B Agecroft    
Steam Crab 2-6-0 4w/e 23/03/1957 42727 Transfer in from: 26A Newton Heath    
Steam Crab 2-6-0 4w/e 23/03/1957 42878 Transfer in from: 26A Newton Heath    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 4w/e 23/03/1957 47258 Transfer in from: 4C Swansea (Upper Bank)    
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 4w/e 23/03/1957 78043 Transfer out to: 27A Bank Hall    
Steam 27 0-6-0 w/e 06/04/1957 52379 Condemned      
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 13/04/1957 90234 Transfer out to: 66A Polmadie    
Steam 27 0-6-0 4w/e 20/04/1957 52160 Transfer in from: 24D Lower Darwen    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 18/05/1957 41283 Transfer out to: 27A Bank Hall    
Steam 23 0-6-0ST 4w/e 16/06/1957 51413 Transfer out to: 26B Agecroft    
Steam 7F 0-8-0 06/07/1957 49545 Condemned      
Steam 27 0-6-0 w/e 06/07/1957 52160 Condemned      
Steam 27 0-6-0 4w/e 10/08/1957 52260 Transfer in from: 24D Lower Darwen    
Steam 7F 0-8-0 15/08/1957 49566 Condemned      
Steam 27 0-6-0 w/e 31/08/1957 52136 Condemned      
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 16/11/1957 47258 Condemned      
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 4w/e 30/11/1957 47259 Transfer in from: 27A Bank Hall    
Steam 7F 0-8-0 4w/e 28/12/1957 49668 Transfer in from: 26F Lees (Oldham)    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 28/12/1957 90141 Transfer out to: 26E Lees (Oldham)    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 22/02/1958 90675 Transfer out to: 26A Newton Heath    
Steam Crab 2-6-0 4w/e 04/10/1958 42845 Transfer in from: 26B Agecroft    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 22/11/1958 90552 Transfer in from: 26A Newton Heath    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 10/01/1959 90316 Transfer in from: 24J Lancaster Green Ayre    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 10/01/1959 90327 Transfer in from: 24J Lancaster Green Ayre    
Steam Crab 2-6-0 w/e 07/02/1959 42864 Transfer in from: 26B Agecroft    
Steam 7F 0-8-0 16/05/1959 49640 Condemned      
Steam 7F 0-8-0 01/08/1959 49586 Condemned      
Steam 27 0-6-0 w/e 07/11/1959 52135 Condemned      
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 12/12/1959 90245 Transfer in from: 26A Newton Heath    
Steam 7F 0-8-0 w/e 06/02/1960 49637 Transfer out to: 26B Agecroft    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 20/02/1960 90599 Transfer in from: 26B Agecroft    
Steam 7F 0-8-0 w/e 20/02/1960 49668 Transfer out to: 26B Agecroft    
Steam Crab 2-6-0 w/e 12/03/1960 42864 Transfer out to: 27D Wigan Central (L&Y)    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 09/04/1960 47655 Transfer in from: 27E Walton on the Hill    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 09/04/1960 90297 Transfer in from: 26C Bolton    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 09/04/1960 90576 Transfer in from: 26A Newton Heath    
Steam 27 0-6-0 m/e 11/1960 52378 Condemned      
Steam Crab 2-6-0 w/e 05/11/1960 42715 Transfer in from: 27D Wigan Central (L&Y)    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 12/11/1960 90219 Transfer in from: 26D Bury    
Steam 27 0-6-0 w/e 24/12/1960 52456 Transfer out to: 26E Lees (Oldham)    
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 w/e 14/01/1961 78040 Transfer in from: 27D Wigan Central (L&Y)    
Steam 27 0-6-0 w/e 01/04/1961 52260 Condemned      
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 06/05/1961 47512 Transfer in from:        
Steam 27 0-6-0 w/e 20/05/1961 52171 Condemned      
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 17/06/1961 90297 Transfer out to: 24D Lower Darwen    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 17/06/1961 90316 Transfer out to: 24D Lower Darwen    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 17/06/1961 90375 Transfer out to: 24D Lower Darwen    
Steam 24 0-6-0T 21/09/1961 51537 Condemned      
Steam 27 0-6-0 w/e 03/03/1962 52311 Condemned      
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 10/03/1962 47480 Transfer in from: 27A Bank Hall    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 17/03/1962 44692 Transfer in from: 27C Southport    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 17/03/1962 44729 Transfer in from:        
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 17/03/1962 44887 Transfer in from: 23C Southport    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 17/03/1962 45061 Transfer in from: 27C Southport    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 17/03/1962 45210 Transfer in from: 27A Bank Hall    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 17/03/1962 45228 Transfer in from: 27C Southport    
Steam Crab 2-6-0 w/e 17/03/1962 42715 Transfer out to: 27D Wigan Central (L&Y)    
Steam Crab 2-6-0 w/e 17/03/1962 42721 Transfer out to: 27D Wigan Central (L&Y)    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 24/03/1962 47259 Condemned      
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 19/05/1962 47425 Condemned      
Steam Crab 2-6-0 w/e 16/06/1962 42711 Transfer out to: 27D Wigan Central (L&Y)    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 04/08/1962 90576 Transfer out to: 24B Rose Grove    
Steam Crab 2-6-0 w/e 15/09/1962 42730 Transfer in from: 26D Bury    
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 w/e 15/09/1962 78043 Transfer in from: 27A Bank Hall    
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 w/e 15/09/1962 78044 Transfer in from: 27A Bank Hall    
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 w/e 15/09/1962 78060 Transfer in from: 27D Wigan Central (L&Y)    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 15/09/1962 46405 Transfer out to: 26D Bury    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 15/09/1962 46412 Transfer out to: 26D Bury    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 15/09/1962 46439 Transfer out to: 26D Bury    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 15/09/1962 90164 Transfer out to: 24B Rose Grove    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 15/09/1962 90219 Transfer out to: 24B Rose Grove    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 15/09/1962 90327 Transfer out to: 24B Rose Grove    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 15/09/1962 90724 Transfer out to: 24B Rose Grove    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 29/12/1962 90278 Condemned      
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 16/01/1963 42953 Transfer in from: 5D Stoke    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 19/01/1963 90125 Transfer in from: 8B Warrington Dallam    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 19/01/1963 90141 Transfer in from: 8D Widnes    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 26/01/1963 48385 Transfer out to: 2F Woodford Halse    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 11/05/1963 45330 Transfer in from: 68A Carlisle Kingmoor    
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 w/e 11/05/1963 78022 Transfer in from: 12E Barrow in Furness    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 11/05/1963 45210 Transfer out to: 12A Carlisle Kingmoor    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 11/05/1963 90527 Condemned      
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 18/05/1963 44676 Transfer in from: 12A Carlisle Kingmoor    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 18/05/1963 44958 Transfer in from: 68A Carlisle Kingmoor    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 18/05/1963 45112 Transfer in from: 12A Carlisle Kingmoor    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 18/05/1963 45118 Transfer in from: 68A Carlisle Kingmoor    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 18/05/1963 45120 Transfer in from: 68A Carlisle Kingmoor    
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 w/e 18/05/1963 78023 Transfer in from: 12E Barrow in Furness    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 18/05/1963 44692 Transfer out to: 12A Carlisle Kingmoor    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 18/05/1963 44729 Transfer out to: 12A Carlisle Kingmoor    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 18/05/1963 44887 Transfer out to: 12A Carlisle Kingmoor    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 18/05/1963 45061 Transfer out to: 12A Carlisle Kingmoor    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 18/05/1963 45228 Transfer out to: 12A Carlisle Kingmoor    
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 w/e 25/05/1963 78043 Transfer out to: 1A Willesden    
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 w/e 25/05/1963 78060 Transfer out to: 1A Willesden    
Steam Crab 2-6-0 w/e 22/06/1963 42715 Transfer in from: 27D Wigan Central (L&Y)    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 22/06/1963 44676 Transfer out to: 26A Newton Heath    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 22/06/1963 45118 Transfer out to: 26A Newton Heath    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 13/07/1963 90125 Transfer out to: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 13/07/1963 90535 Transfer out to: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 19/10/1963 90702 Transfer in from: 8G Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 09/11/1963 42956 Transfer in from: 5D Stoke    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 09/11/1963 42953 Transfer out to: 12A Carlisle Kingmoor    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 16/11/1963 90107 Condemned      
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 23/11/1963 42952 Transfer in from: 9J Agecroft    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 23/11/1963 42960 Transfer in from: 9J Agecroft    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 23/11/1963 42961 Transfer in from: 9K Bolton    
Steam Crab 2-6-0 w/e 23/11/1963 42715 Transfer out to: 9G Gorton    
Steam Crab 2-6-0 w/e 23/11/1963 42730 Transfer out to: 8P Wigan Central (L&Y)    
Steam Crab 2-6-0 w/e 23/11/1963 42845 Transfer out to: 9G Gorton    
Steam Crab 2-6-0 w/e 23/11/1963 42878 Transfer out to: 9G Gorton    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 23/11/1963 45112 Transfer out to: 12A Carlisle Kingmoor    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 23/11/1963 45120 Transfer out to: 12A Carlisle Kingmoor    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 07/12/1963 45451 Transfer in from: 12A Carlisle Kingmoor    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 14/12/1963 42054 Transfer in from: 27E Walton on the Hill    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 14/12/1963 45323 Transfer in from: 12A Carlisle Kingmoor    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 14/12/1963 47228 Transfer in from: 27E Walton on the Hill    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 14/12/1963 47327 Transfer in from: 27A Bank Hall    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 14/12/1963 47681 Transfer in from: 27E Walton on the Hill    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 14/12/1963 75015 Transfer in from: 27C Southport    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 14/12/1963 75043 Transfer in from: 8R Walton on the Hill    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 14/12/1963 75060 Transfer in from: 8R Walton on the Hill    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 14/12/1963 75061 Transfer in from: 8R Walton on the Hill    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 14/12/1963 75064 Transfer in from: 8R Walton on the Hill    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 14/12/1963 90242 Transfer in from: 10C Fleetwood    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 14/12/1963 90413 Transfer in from: 24F Fleetwood    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 21/12/1963 90343 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 w/e 28/12/1963 78022 Transfer out to: 10D Lostock Hall    
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 w/e 28/12/1963 78044 Transfer out to: 10D Lostock Hall    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 28/12/1963 90604 Condemned      
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 11/01/1964 45104 Transfer in from: 26A Newton Heath    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 11/01/1964 45154 Transfer in from: 26A Newton Heath    
Steam Crab 2-6-0 w/e 11/01/1964 42727 Transfer out to: 10F Rose Grove    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 18/01/1964 90316 Transfer in from: 24J Lancaster Green Ayre    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 25/01/1964 45068 Transfer in from: 24B Rose Grove    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 25/01/1964 45229 Transfer in from: 24B Rose Grove    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 08/02/1964 47228 Condemned      
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 08/02/1964 90643 Condemned      
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 15/02/1964 90316 Transfer out to: 9K Bolton    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 22/02/1964 90141 Condemned      
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 29/02/1964 90584 Transfer in from: 9K Bolton    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 14/03/1964 42054 Transfer out to: 9D Newton Heath    
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 w/e 21/03/1964 78055 Transfer in from: 24G Skipton    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 21/03/1964 47480 Transfer out to: 9D Newton Heath    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 m/e 04/1964 90245 Condemned      
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 m/e 04/1964 90416 Condemned      
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 m/e 04/1964 90552 Condemned      
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 04/04/1964 47305 Transfer out to: 12C Barrow in Furness    
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 w/e 11/04/1964 78044 Transfer in from: 10D Lostock Hall    
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 w/e 11/04/1964 78040 Transfer out to: 10D Lostock Hall    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 25/04/1964 90474 Transfer in from: 38E Woodford Halse    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 25/04/1964 90563 Transfer in from: 1G Woodford Halse    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 25/04/1964 75015 Transfer out to: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 16/05/1964 90101 Condemned      
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 23/05/1964 46404 Transfer in from: 16A Nottingham    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 23/05/1964 46500 Transfer in from: 17A Derby    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 23/05/1964 46502 Transfer in from: 17A Derby    
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 w/e 23/05/1964 78023 Transfer out to: 16D Nottingham    
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 w/e 23/05/1964 78044 Transfer out to: 16D Nottingham    
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 w/e 23/05/1964 78055 Transfer out to: 16D Nottingham    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 30/05/1964 90706 Transfer in from: 24J Lancaster Green Ayre    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 13/06/1964 90346 Transfer in from: 9D Newton Heath    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 20/06/1964 45154 Transfer out to: 9D Newton Heath    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 27/06/1964 45104 Transfer out to: 9D Newton Heath    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 27/06/1964 45451 Transfer out to: 9D Newton Heath    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 07/1964 42952 Transfer out to: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 07/1964 42956 Transfer out to: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 07/1964 42960 Transfer out to: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 07/1964 42961 Transfer out to: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 m/e 07/1964 90216 Condemned      
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 m/e 07/1964 90712 Condemned      
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 04/07/1964 47289 Transfer in from: 8A Edge Hill    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 04/07/1964 47566 Transfer in from: 8A Edge Hill    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 04/07/1964 90123 Transfer in from: 9D Newton Heath    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 04/07/1964 90271 Transfer in from: 26A Newton Heath    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 04/07/1964 90289 Transfer in from: 26A Newton Heath    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 11/07/1964 90399 Transfer in from: 26A Newton Heath    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 11/07/1964 90520 Transfer in from: 9D Newton Heath    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 11/07/1964 90561 Transfer in from: 26A Newton Heath    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 25/07/1964 90123 Transfer out to: 10H Lower Darwen    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 25/07/1964 90271 Transfer out to: 10F Rose Grove    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 25/07/1964 90283 Transfer out to: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 25/07/1964 90289 Transfer out to: 10F Rose Grove    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 25/07/1964 90399 Transfer out to: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 25/07/1964 90561 Transfer out to: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 25/07/1964 90687 Transfer out to: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 25/07/1964 90702 Transfer out to: 8G Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 25/07/1964 90599 Condemned      
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 22/08/1964 90327 Transfer in from: 9K Bolton    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 22/08/1964 90419 Transfer in from: 9K Bolton    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 22/08/1964 90687 Transfer in from: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 29/08/1964 90520 Transfer out to: 9D Newton Heath    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 05/09/1964 90584 Condemned      
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 12/09/1964 90242 Transfer out to: 40B Immingham    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 12/09/1964 90282 Transfer out to: 40E Colwick    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 12/09/1964 90413 Transfer out to: 40E Colwick    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 12/09/1964 90419 Transfer out to: 41E Staveley (Barrow Hill)    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 12/09/1964 90474 Transfer out to: 41E Staveley (Barrow Hill)    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 12/09/1964 90687 Transfer out to: 36A Doncaster    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 19/09/1964 90516 Transfer in from: 9D Newton Heath    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 19/09/1964 90520 Transfer in from: 9D Newton Heath    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 19/09/1964 90718 Transfer in from: 9D Newton Heath    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 03/10/1964 90248 Transfer in from: 9K Bolton    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 03/10/1964 90267 Transfer in from: 26C Bolton    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 03/10/1964 90486 Transfer in from: 9K Bolton    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 03/10/1964 90641 Transfer in from: 26C Bolton    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 03/10/1964 90689 Transfer in from: 9K Bolton    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 10/10/1964 90306 Transfer in from: 26B Agecroft    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 24/10/1964 90222 Transfer in from: 10F Rose Grove    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 12/12/1964 90080 Transfer in from: 9G Gorton    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 12/12/1964 90284 Transfer in from: 9G Gorton    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 26/12/1964 90274 Transfer in from: 9G Gorton    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 26/12/1964 90080 Transfer out to: 9G Gorton    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 16/01/1965 90327 Condemned      
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 30/01/1965 90632 Transfer in from: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 30/01/1965 90724 Transfer in from: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 06/02/1965 90520 Condemned      
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 13/02/1965 90533 Transfer in from: 9G Gorton    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 06/03/1965 90284 Condemned      
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 13/03/1965 90267 Condemned      
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 03/04/1965 48050 Transfer in from: 8B Warrington Dallam    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 03/04/1965 48108 Transfer in from: 8B Warrington Dallam    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 03/04/1965 48139 Transfer in from: 8B Warrington Dallam    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 03/04/1965 48268 Transfer in from: 8B Warrington Dallam    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 03/04/1965 48421 Transfer in from: 8B Warrington Dallam    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 03/04/1965 48451 Transfer in from: 8B Warrington Dallam    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 03/04/1965 48500 Transfer in from: 8B Warrington Dallam    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 03/04/1965 48558 Transfer in from: 8B Warrington Dallam    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 03/04/1965 48676 Transfer in from: 8B Warrington Dallam    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 03/04/1965 48715 Transfer in from: 8B Warrington Dallam    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 03/04/1965 90204 Transfer out to: 10H Lower Darwen    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 03/04/1965 90486 Condemned      
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 17/04/1965 48017 Transfer in from: 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 17/04/1965 48290 Transfer in from: 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 17/04/1965 48340 Transfer in from: 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 17/04/1965 48422 Transfer in from: 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 17/04/1965 48605 Transfer in from: 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 17/04/1965 48648 Transfer in from: 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 17/04/1965 48704 Transfer in from: 8B Warrington Dallam    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 17/04/1965 90248 Transfer out to: 36C Frodingham    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 17/04/1965 90274 Transfer out to: 36C Frodingham    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 17/04/1965 90381 Transfer out to: 36C Frodingham    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 17/04/1965 90516 Transfer out to: 36C Frodingham    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 17/04/1965 90533 Transfer out to: 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 17/04/1965 90689 Transfer out to: 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 17/04/1965 90718 Transfer out to: 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 01/05/1965 47681 Transfer out to: 9J Agecroft    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 08/05/1965 90306 Transfer out to: 10F Rose Grove    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 08/05/1965 90346 Transfer out to: 10F Rose Grove    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 08/05/1965 46404 Condemned      
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 08/05/1965 47512 Condemned      
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 08/05/1965 90632 Condemned      
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 05/06/1965 90724 Condemned      
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 12/06/1965 90706 Transfer out to: 41E Staveley (Barrow Hill)    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 19/06/1965 46439 Transfer in from: 9K Bolton    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 19/06/1965 46523 Transfer in from: 26A Newton Heath    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 19/06/1965 47453 Transfer in from: 10E Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 26/06/1965 48290 Transfer out to: 8G Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 26/06/1965 48422 Transfer out to: 8G Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 26/06/1965 48451 Transfer out to: 10F Rose Grove    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 26/06/1965 48558 Transfer out to: 10F Rose Grove    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 26/06/1965 48715 Transfer out to: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 26/06/1965 75060 Transfer out to: 8A Edge Hill    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 03/07/1965 47367 Transfer in from: 8G Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 03/07/1965 44958 Transfer out to: 10D Lostock Hall    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 03/07/1965 45068 Transfer out to: 8B Warrington Dallam    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 03/07/1965 45323 Transfer out to: 8B Warrington Dallam    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 10/07/1965 48301 Transfer in from: 15A Leicester Midland    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 24/07/1965 45147 Transfer in from: 5C Stafford    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 24/07/1965 48363 Transfer in from: 16E Kirkby in Ashfield    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 07/08/1965 90222 Condemned      
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 07/08/1965 90563 Condemned      
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 07/08/1965 90641 Condemned      
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 21/08/1965 44910 Transfer in from: 5B Crewe South    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 04/09/1965 45229 Condemned      
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 11/09/1965 48704 Condemned      
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 13/11/1965 47655 Condemned      
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 04/12/1965 47279 Transfer in from: 12D Workington    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 18/12/1965 48500 Condemned      
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 22/01/1966 46419 Transfer in from: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 12/03/1966 48206 Transfer in from: 2B Nuneaton    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 12/03/1966 48650 Transfer in from: 5E Nuneaton    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 19/03/1966 48050 Condemned      
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 23/04/1966 48206 Transfer out to: 8G Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 23/04/1966 47453 Condemned      
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 30/04/1966 44659 Transfer in from: 40E Colwick    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 07/05/1966 47444 Transfer in from: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 14/05/1966 48108 Transfer out to: 9L Buxton (LNWR)    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 23/07/1966 48412 Transfer in from: 2C Stourbridge Junction    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 06/08/1966 48605 Condemned      
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 20/08/1966 48412 Transfer out to: 8C Speke Junction    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 20/08/1966 48648 Transfer out to: 8C Speke Junction    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 m/e 09/1966 46419 Condemned      
Steam 3F 0-6-0T m/e 10/1966 47566 Condemned      
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T w/e 22/10/1966 41244 Transfer in from: 8K Bank Hall    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T w/e 22/10/1966 41304 Transfer in from: 8K Bank Hall    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 22/10/1966 44809 Transfer in from: 8K Bank Hall    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 22/10/1966 44816 Transfer in from: 8K Bank Hall    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 22/10/1966 45055 Transfer in from: 8K Bank Hall    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 22/10/1966 75026 Transfer in from: 8K Bank Hall    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 22/10/1966 75027 Transfer in from: 8K Bank Hall    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 12/11/1966 44858 Transfer in from: 16B Colwick    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 12/11/1966 48600 Transfer in from: 16B Colwick    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 12/11/1966 75027 Transfer out to: 10G Skipton    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 19/11/1966 47279 Transfer out to: 8G Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 19/11/1966 47289 Transfer out to: 8G Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 19/11/1966 75026 Transfer out to: 10G Skipton    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T w/e 19/11/1966 41244 Condemned      
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T w/e 19/11/1966 41304 Condemned      
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 19/11/1966 48139 Condemned      
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 26/11/1966 47444 Condemned      
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 26/11/1966 48600 Condemned      
Steam 3F 0-6-0T m/e 12/1966 47367 Condemned      
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 10/12/1966 48315 Transfer in from: 40E Colwick    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 24/12/1966 47327 Condemned      
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 07/01/1967 46500 Condemned      
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 04/02/1967 48212 Transfer in from: 40E Colwick    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 04/02/1967 75061 Condemned      
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 18/02/1967 48279 Transfer in from: 16E Kirkby in Ashfield    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 25/02/1967 46502 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 11/03/1967 75020 Transfer in from: 6D Shrewsbury    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 11/03/1967 48301 Condemned      
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 18/03/1967 46439 Condemned      
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 29/04/1967 48212 Transfer out to: 8E Northwich    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 29/04/1967 48421 Transfer out to: 8E Northwich    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 06/05/1967 46523 Condemned      
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 13/05/1967 45055 Transfer out to: 8B Warrington Dallam    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 13/05/1967 45330 Transfer out to: 8B Warrington Dallam    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 13/05/1967 48363 Transfer out to: 8E Northwich    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 13/05/1967 48650 Transfer out to: 8E Northwich    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 20/05/1967 45147 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 20/05/1967 75064 Condemned      
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 17/06/1967 44809 Transfer out to: 8B Warrington Dallam    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 17/06/1967 44816 Transfer out to: 8B Warrington Dallam    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 17/06/1967 44858 Transfer out to: 12A Carlisle Kingmoor    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 17/06/1967 44910 Transfer out to: 12A Carlisle Kingmoor    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 17/06/1967 48017 Transfer out to: 8A Edge Hill    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 17/06/1967 48268 Transfer out to: 8A Edge Hill    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 17/06/1967 48279 Transfer out to: 8G Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 17/06/1967 48315 Transfer out to: 9F Heaton Mersey    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 17/06/1967 48340 Transfer out to: 8E Northwich    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 17/06/1967 48676 Transfer out to: 8G Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 17/06/1967 75020 Transfer out to: 10A Carnforth    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 17/06/1967 75043 Transfer out to: 10A Carnforth    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 17/06/1967 44659 Condemned