Steam |
Prince of Wales |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
30/11/1935 |
25645 |
Transfer in from: |
4A |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
2665 |
4-6-2T |
4w/e |
30/11/1935 |
6985 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
08/02/1936 |
5597 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
08/02/1936 |
5599 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
George V |
4-4-0 |
4w/e |
11/04/1936 |
25395 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
George V |
4-4-0 |
4w/e |
11/04/1936 |
25406 |
Transfer in from: |
2C |
Northampton |
|
|
Steam |
Prince of Wales |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
11/04/1936 |
25773 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
George V |
4-4-0 |
4w/e |
11/04/1936 |
5348 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Prince of Wales |
4-6-0 |
m/e |
06/1936 |
25645 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
11/07/1936 |
2975 |
Transfer in from: |
BHD |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Steam |
George V |
4-4-0 |
m/e |
02/1937 |
25395 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
George V |
4-4-0 |
m/e |
04/1937 |
25406 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
2665 |
4-6-2T |
m/e |
04/1937 |
6985 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Prince of Wales |
4-6-0 |
m/e |
05/1937 |
25773 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
03/07/1937 |
2975 |
Transfer out to: |
BHD |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
25/09/1937 |
2971 |
Transfer in from: |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
25/11/1939 |
2971 |
Transfer out to: |
BHD |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Steam |
George V |
4-4-0 |
m/e |
06/1940 |
25348 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
12/10/1940 |
2976 |
Transfer in from: |
BHD |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
12/10/1940 |
2979 |
Transfer in from: |
BHD |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
22/02/1941 |
2976 |
Transfer out to: |
BHD |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
05/04/1941 |
2976 |
Transfer in from: |
BHD |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
08/11/1941 |
2979 |
Transfer out to: |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
17/01/1942 |
2978 |
Transfer in from: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
02/05/1942 |
2978 |
Transfer out to: |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
30/01/1943 |
2976 |
Transfer out to: |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
28/08/1943 |
2976 |
Transfer in from: |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
14/07/1945 |
2976 |
Transfer out to: |
7A |
Llandudno Junction |
|
|
Steam |
Compound |
4-4-0 |
4w/e |
22/06/1946 |
1163 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
4w/e |
22/06/1946 |
7821 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Compound |
4-4-0 |
4w/e |
22/06/1946 |
900 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Compound |
4-4-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
1098 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Compound |
4-4-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
1106 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Compound |
4-4-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
1107 |
Snapshot |
2A |
Rugby |
|
|
Steam |
Compound |
4-4-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
1108 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Compound |
4-4-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
1120 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Compound |
4-4-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
1121 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Compound |
4-4-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
1157 |
Snapshot |
7A |
Llandudno Junction |
|
|
Steam |
Compound |
4-4-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
1158 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Compound |
4-4-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
1162 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Compound |
4-4-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
1163 |
Snapshot |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
|
Steam |
Compound |
4-4-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
1163 |
Snapshot |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
|
Steam |
Compound |
4-4-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
1164 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Compound |
4-4-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
1169 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Compound |
4-4-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
1170 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
130 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
2425 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
2540 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
2568 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
2587 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
2617 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
2677 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
5042 |
Snapshot |
19G |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
|
Steam |
27 |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
52417 |
Snapshot |
23D |
Wigan Central (L&Y) |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
5247 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
5275 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
5297 |
Snapshot |
3E |
Monument Lane |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
5382 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
5403 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
5597 |
Snapshot |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
5599 |
Snapshot |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
7297 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
7373 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
7374 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
7375 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
7383 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
7504 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
7600 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Compound |
4-4-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
900 |
Snapshot |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
|
Steam |
Compound |
4-4-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
900 |
Snapshot |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
|
Steam |
Compound |
4-4-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
926 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Compound |
4-4-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
933 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
10/01/1948 |
2267 |
Transfer in from: |
11A |
Carnforth |
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
w/e |
17/01/1948 |
130 |
Transfer out to: |
7A |
Llandudno Junction |
|
|
Steam |
27 |
0-6-0 |
on |
14/02/1948 |
52417 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
483 |
4-4-0 |
w/e |
21/02/1948 |
527 |
Transfer in from: |
8D |
Widnes |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
28/02/1948 |
2450 |
Transfer in from: |
3E |
Monument Lane |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
28/02/1948 |
2451 |
Transfer in from: |
3E |
Monument Lane |
|
|
Steam |
483 |
4-4-0 |
w/e |
28/02/1948 |
332 |
Transfer in from: |
10C |
Patricroft |
|
|
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
28/02/1948 |
52208 |
Transfer in from: |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
28/02/1948 |
2267 |
Transfer out to: |
3E |
Monument Lane |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
28/02/1948 |
2677 |
Transfer out to: |
3E |
Monument Lane |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
13/03/1948 |
7389 |
Transfer in from: |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
13/03/1948 |
52208 |
Transfer out to: |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Steam |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
on |
27/03/1948 |
58931 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
08/05/1948 |
5070 |
Transfer in from: |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
George V |
4-4-0 |
w/e |
26/06/1948 |
25328 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
17/07/1948 |
28451 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
21/08/1948 |
5070 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
Compound |
4-4-0 |
w/e |
21/08/1948 |
926 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
11/09/1948 |
28451 |
Transfer out to: |
5D |
Stoke |
|
|
Steam |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
02/10/1948 |
28531 |
Transfer in from: |
3C |
Ryecroft (Walsall) |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
02/10/1948 |
45385 |
Transfer in from: |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
02/10/1948 |
4840 |
Transfer in from: |
7A |
Llandudno Junction |
|
|
Steam |
483 |
4-4-0 |
w/e |
02/10/1948 |
40332 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
483 |
4-4-0 |
w/e |
02/10/1948 |
527 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
20/11/1948 |
28531 |
Transfer out to: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
3w/e |
11/12/1948 |
45403 |
Transfer out to: |
10C |
Patricroft |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
3w/e |
11/12/1948 |
5042 |
Transfer out to: |
7A |
Llandudno Junction |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
08/01/1949 |
42455 |
Transfer in from: |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
08/01/1949 |
47373 |
Transfer out to: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
26/03/1949 |
44708 |
Transfer in from: |
7C |
Holyhead |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
26/03/1949 |
44844 |
Transfer in from: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
28/05/1949 |
45045 |
Transfer in from: |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
28/05/1949 |
42617 |
Transfer out to: |
7B |
Bangor |
|
|
Steam |
Compound |
4-4-0 |
w/e |
04/06/1949 |
41122 |
Transfer in from: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Steam |
2P |
4-4-0 |
w/e |
02/07/1949 |
40658 |
Transfer in from: |
7A |
Llandudno Junction |
|
|
Steam |
483 |
4-4-0 |
w/e |
02/07/1949 |
464 |
Transfer in from: |
2D |
Nuneaton |
|
|
Steam |
2P |
4-4-0 |
5w/e |
16/07/1949 |
40658 |
Transfer in from: |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
|
Steam |
2P |
4-4-0 |
5w/e |
16/07/1949 |
40658 |
Transfer out to: |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
|
Steam |
Compound |
4-4-0 |
5w/e |
16/07/1949 |
41122 |
Transfer out to: |
3E |
Monument Lane |
|
|
Steam |
483 |
4-4-0 |
5w/e |
16/07/1949 |
464 |
Transfer out to: |
TFD |
Trafford Park (LNER) |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
20/08/1949 |
44708 |
Transfer out to: |
10B |
Preston |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
17/09/1949 |
42588 |
Transfer in from: |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
Compound |
4-4-0 |
w/e |
22/10/1949 |
40900 |
Transfer out to: |
7A |
Llandudno Junction |
|
|
Steam |
Compound |
4-4-0 |
w/e |
22/10/1949 |
40933 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
C13 |
4-4-2T |
m/e |
30/04/1950 |
67433 |
Transfer in from: |
NTH |
Northwich |
|
|
Steam |
Compound |
4-4-0 |
w/e |
10/06/1950 |
41162 |
Transfer out to: |
8E |
Brunswick |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
10/06/1950 |
42588 |
Transfer out to: |
7B |
Bangor |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
10/06/1950 |
45382 |
Transfer out to: |
7C |
Holyhead |
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
2w/e |
17/06/1950 |
40144 |
Transfer in from: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
2w/e |
17/06/1950 |
44971 |
Transfer in from: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
2w/e |
17/06/1950 |
47504 |
Transfer in from: |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
2w/e |
17/06/1950 |
45297 |
Transfer out to: |
19B |
Sheffield Millhouses |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
2w/e |
17/06/1950 |
47504 |
Transfer out to: |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
|
Steam |
C13 |
4-4-2T |
2w/e |
17/06/1950 |
67433 |
Transfer out to: |
6D |
Chester Northgate |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
09/09/1950 |
45095 |
Transfer in from: |
7A |
Llandudno Junction |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
09/09/1950 |
44971 |
Transfer out to: |
7A |
Llandudno Junction |
|
|
Steam |
483 |
4-4-0 |
w/e |
16/09/1950 |
40430 |
Transfer in from: |
2D |
Nuneaton |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
30/09/1950 |
42660 |
Transfer in from: |
7B |
Bangor |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
30/09/1950 |
44807 |
Transfer in from: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
30/09/1950 |
45307 |
Transfer in from: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
07/10/1950 |
42660 |
Transfer in from: |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
07/10/1950 |
45307 |
Transfer in from: |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
07/10/1950 |
42660 |
Transfer out to: |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
07/10/1950 |
44807 |
Transfer out to: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
07/10/1950 |
45307 |
Transfer out to: |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
04/11/1950 |
42155 |
Transfer in from: |
5D |
Stoke |
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
4w/e |
04/11/1950 |
40144 |
Transfer out to: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
m/e |
30/11/1950 |
45095 |
Transfer in from: |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
m/e |
30/11/1950 |
45095 |
Transfer out to: |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
02/12/1950 |
42155 |
Transfer out to: |
5D |
Stoke |
|
|
Steam |
Compound |
4-4-0 |
4w/e |
24/02/1951 |
41166 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
24/02/1951 |
44710 |
Transfer in from: |
2A |
Rugby |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
24/02/1951 |
44759 |
Transfer in from: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
24/02/1951 |
44910 |
Transfer in from: |
2A |
Rugby |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
24/02/1951 |
45070 |
Transfer in from: |
7C |
Holyhead |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
24/02/1951 |
45332 |
Transfer in from: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
Compound |
4-4-0 |
4w/e |
24/02/1951 |
41170 |
Transfer out to: |
8E |
Brunswick |
|
|
Steam |
Compound |
4-4-0 |
m/e |
28/02/1951 |
41166 |
Transfer in from: |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
m/e |
28/02/1951 |
44710 |
Transfer in from: |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
m/e |
28/02/1951 |
44759 |
Transfer in from: |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
m/e |
28/02/1951 |
44910 |
Transfer in from: |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
m/e |
28/02/1951 |
45070 |
Transfer in from: |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
m/e |
28/02/1951 |
45332 |
Transfer in from: |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
|
Steam |
Compound |
4-4-0 |
m/e |
28/02/1951 |
41166 |
Transfer out to: |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
m/e |
28/02/1951 |
44710 |
Transfer out to: |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
m/e |
28/02/1951 |
44759 |
Transfer out to: |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
m/e |
28/02/1951 |
44910 |
Transfer out to: |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
m/e |
28/02/1951 |
45070 |
Transfer out to: |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
m/e |
28/02/1951 |
45332 |
Transfer out to: |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
w/e |
10/03/1951 |
40144 |
Transfer in from: |
5D |
Stoke |
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
4w/e |
24/03/1951 |
40144 |
Transfer in from: |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
4w/e |
24/03/1951 |
40144 |
Transfer out to: |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
24/03/1951 |
44759 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
24/03/1951 |
45070 |
Transfer out to: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
24/03/1951 |
45332 |
Transfer out to: |
10B |
Preston |
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
4w/e |
19/05/1951 |
40144 |
Transfer out to: |
5D |
Stoke |
|
|
Steam |
2P |
4-4-0 |
w/e |
26/05/1951 |
40324 |
Transfer in from: |
7D |
Rhyl |
|
|
Steam |
2P |
4-4-0 |
4w/e |
16/06/1951 |
40324 |
Transfer in from: |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
|
Steam |
2P |
4-4-0 |
4w/e |
16/06/1951 |
40324 |
Transfer out to: |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
|
Steam |
483 |
4-4-0 |
w/e |
07/07/1951 |
40430 |
Transfer out to: |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
07/07/1951 |
45045 |
Transfer out to: |
7C |
Holyhead |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
07/07/1951 |
45095 |
Transfer out to: |
7C |
Holyhead |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
07/07/1951 |
45247 |
Transfer out to: |
7C |
Holyhead |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
17/07/1951 |
42061 |
Transfer in from: |
9G |
Northwich |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
17/07/1951 |
42315 |
Transfer in from: |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
17/07/1951 |
42426 |
Transfer in from: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
483 |
4-4-0 |
w/e |
15/09/1951 |
40377 |
Transfer in from: |
7A |
Llandudno Junction |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
15/09/1951 |
45095 |
Transfer in from: |
7C |
Holyhead |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
15/09/1951 |
45402 |
Transfer in from: |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
29/09/1951 |
42426 |
Transfer out to: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
483 |
4-4-0 |
4w/e |
06/10/1951 |
40377 |
Transfer in from: |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
06/10/1951 |
44869 |
Transfer in from: |
4A |
Bletchley |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
06/10/1951 |
45095 |
Transfer in from: |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
06/10/1951 |
45402 |
Transfer in from: |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
|
Steam |
483 |
4-4-0 |
4w/e |
06/10/1951 |
40377 |
Transfer out to: |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
06/10/1951 |
45095 |
Transfer out to: |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
06/10/1951 |
45402 |
Transfer out to: |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
13/10/1951 |
44869 |
Transfer out to: |
4A |
Bletchley |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
20/10/1951 |
45130 |
Transfer in from: |
2B |
Bletchley |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
01/12/1951 |
42061 |
Transfer out to: |
5D |
Stoke |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
01/12/1951 |
44840 |
Transfer out to: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
01/12/1951 |
44844 |
Transfer out to: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
23/02/1952 |
45130 |
Transfer out to: |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
|
Steam |
Compound |
4-4-0 |
4w/e |
22/03/1952 |
41107 |
Transfer out to: |
11E |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
8w/e |
14/06/1952 |
45095 |
Transfer out to: |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
|
Steam |
Compound |
4-4-0 |
5w/e |
21/06/1952 |
41098 |
Transfer out to: |
35C |
Spital Bridge |
|
|
Steam |
2P |
4-4-0 |
4w/e |
12/07/1952 |
40324 |
Transfer out to: |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
12/07/1952 |
42455 |
Transfer out to: |
6H |
Bangor |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
12/07/1952 |
45307 |
Transfer out to: |
3C |
Ryecroft (Walsall) |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
12/07/1952 |
45402 |
Transfer out to: |
3A |
Bescot |
|
|
Steam |
Compound |
4-4-0 |
4w/e |
09/08/1952 |
41098 |
Transfer in from: |
35C |
Spital Bridge |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
09/08/1952 |
42159 |
Transfer in from: |
1C |
Watford |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
04/10/1952 |
45006 |
Transfer in from: |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
04/10/1952 |
45247 |
Transfer in from: |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
04/10/1952 |
73020 |
Transfer in from: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
01/11/1952 |
45132 |
Transfer in from: |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
8w/e |
29/11/1952 |
42444 |
Transfer in from: |
3C |
Ryecroft (Walsall) |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
8w/e |
29/11/1952 |
45132 |
Transfer in from: |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
8w/e |
29/11/1952 |
45132 |
Transfer out to: |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
8w/e |
11/07/1953 |
42461 |
Transfer in from: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
8w/e |
11/07/1953 |
42672 |
Transfer in from: |
5D |
Stoke |
|
|
Steam |
Compound |
4-4-0 |
8w/e |
11/07/1953 |
41098 |
Transfer out to: |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
|
Steam |
Compound |
4-4-0 |
8w/e |
11/07/1953 |
41163 |
Transfer out to: |
3E |
Monument Lane |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
8w/e |
11/07/1953 |
42444 |
Transfer out to: |
6H |
Bangor |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
8w/e |
11/07/1953 |
45006 |
Transfer out to: |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
8w/e |
11/07/1953 |
45385 |
Transfer out to: |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
05/09/1953 |
42672 |
Transfer out to: |
5D |
Stoke |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
03/10/1953 |
42063 |
Transfer in from: |
5D |
Stoke |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
03/10/1953 |
45043 |
Transfer in from: |
64A |
St Margarets |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
03/10/1953 |
45180 |
Transfer in from: |
64A |
St Margarets |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
03/10/1953 |
73020 |
Transfer out to: |
84K |
Chester West |
|
|
Steam |
Compound |
4-4-0 |
4w/e |
31/10/1953 |
41163 |
Transfer in from: |
3E |
Monument Lane |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
31/10/1953 |
45403 |
Transfer in from: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
28/11/1953 |
45403 |
Transfer out to: |
2A |
Rugby |
|
|
Steam |
483 |
4-4-0 |
8w/e |
19/06/1954 |
40377 |
Transfer out to: |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
|
Steam |
Compound |
4-4-0 |
8w/e |
19/06/1954 |
41108 |
Transfer out to: |
11E |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
|
|
Steam |
Compound |
4-4-0 |
8w/e |
19/06/1954 |
41163 |
Transfer out to: |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
|
Steam |
Compound |
4-4-0 |
8w/e |
19/06/1954 |
41169 |
Transfer out to: |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
8w/e |
19/06/1954 |
45180 |
Transfer out to: |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
|
Steam |
Compound |
4-4-0 |
4w/e |
14/08/1954 |
41121 |
Transfer out to: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
Compound |
4-4-0 |
4w/e |
14/08/1954 |
41166 |
Transfer out to: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
09/10/1954 |
45132 |
Transfer out to: |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
09/10/1954 |
45247 |
Transfer out to: |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
on |
13/11/1954 |
73070 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
on |
20/11/1954 |
73071 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
2P |
4-4-0 |
4w/e |
04/12/1954 |
40629 |
Transfer in from: |
7D |
Rhyl |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
on |
11/12/1954 |
73072 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
26/02/1955 |
75033 |
Transfer in from: |
1E |
Bletchley |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
26/02/1955 |
75034 |
Transfer in from: |
1E |
Bletchley |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
26/02/1955 |
75035 |
Transfer in from: |
1E |
Bletchley |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
26/02/1955 |
75039 |
Transfer in from: |
1E |
Bletchley |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
23/04/1955 |
44911 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
2P |
4-4-0 |
8w/e |
16/07/1955 |
40629 |
Transfer out to: |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
10/09/1955 |
44910 |
Transfer out to: |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
on |
30/09/1955 |
13177 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
on |
06/10/1955 |
13178 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
2P |
4-4-0 |
4w/e |
08/10/1955 |
40580 |
Transfer in from: |
7D |
Rhyl |
|
|
Steam |
2P |
4-4-0 |
4w/e |
08/10/1955 |
40589 |
Transfer in from: |
6K |
Rhyl |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
08/10/1955 |
44910 |
Transfer in from: |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
08/10/1955 |
45043 |
Transfer out to: |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
|
Steam |
483 |
4-4-0 |
4w/e |
05/11/1955 |
40559 |
Transfer in from: |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
|
Steam |
2P |
4-4-0 |
4w/e |
05/11/1955 |
40675 |
Transfer in from: |
7D |
Rhyl |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
05/11/1955 |
42178 |
Transfer in from: |
6H |
Bangor |
|
|
Steam |
2P |
4-4-0 |
4w/e |
31/12/1955 |
40679 |
Transfer in from: |
7D |
Rhyl |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
31/12/1955 |
45057 |
Transfer in from: |
10C |
Patricroft |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
31/12/1955 |
45312 |
Transfer in from: |
10C |
Patricroft |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
31/12/1955 |
75031 |
Transfer in from: |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
31/12/1955 |
75032 |
Transfer in from: |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
18/02/1956 |
44911 |
Transfer out to: |
34A |
Kings Cross |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
18/02/1956 |
73071 |
Transfer out to: |
34A |
Kings Cross |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
21/04/1956 |
44773 |
Transfer in from: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
19/05/1956 |
46459 |
Transfer in from: |
12D |
Workington |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
19/05/1956 |
75049 |
Transfer in from: |
27A |
Bank Hall |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
19/05/1956 |
44773 |
Transfer out to: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
19/05/1956 |
75034 |
Transfer out to: |
24A |
Accrington |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
09/06/1956 |
75033 |
Transfer out to: |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
m/e |
16/06/1956 |
42465 |
Transfer in from: |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
2P |
4-4-0 |
m/e |
16/06/1956 |
40589 |
Transfer out to: |
6K |
Rhyl |
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
m/e |
16/06/1956 |
46459 |
Transfer out to: |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
m/e |
16/06/1956 |
75032 |
Transfer out to: |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
11/08/1956 |
42563 |
Transfer in from: |
10C |
Patricroft |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
11/08/1956 |
42610 |
Transfer in from: |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
11/08/1956 |
46459 |
Transfer in from: |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
11/08/1956 |
75034 |
Transfer in from: |
24A |
Accrington |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
11/08/1956 |
42465 |
Transfer out to: |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
11/08/1956 |
75049 |
Transfer out to: |
27A |
Bank Hall |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
08/09/1956 |
45057 |
Transfer out to: |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
15/09/1956 |
75033 |
Transfer in from: |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 Tank |
2-6-4T |
on |
15/09/1956 |
80048 |
Transfer in from: |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 Tank |
2-6-4T |
on |
15/09/1956 |
80049 |
Transfer in from: |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 Tank |
2-6-4T |
on |
15/09/1956 |
80050 |
Transfer in from: |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 Tank |
2-6-4T |
on |
15/09/1956 |
80052 |
Transfer in from: |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 Tank |
2-6-4T |
on |
15/09/1956 |
80059 |
Transfer in from: |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
06/10/1956 |
45441 |
Transfer in from: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
06/10/1956 |
75032 |
Transfer in from: |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 Tank |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
06/10/1956 |
80045 |
Transfer in from: |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 Tank |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
06/10/1956 |
80047 |
Transfer in from: |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 Tank |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
06/10/1956 |
80051 |
Transfer in from: |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 Tank |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
06/10/1956 |
80053 |
Transfer in from: |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 Tank |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
06/10/1956 |
80062 |
Transfer in from: |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 Tank |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
06/10/1956 |
80063 |
Transfer in from: |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 Tank |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
06/10/1956 |
80086 |
Transfer in from: |
25A |
Wakefield |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
06/10/1956 |
42063 |
Transfer out to: |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
06/10/1956 |
42159 |
Transfer out to: |
14C |
St Albans |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
06/10/1956 |
42178 |
Transfer out to: |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
06/10/1956 |
42315 |
Transfer out to: |
5D |
Stoke |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
06/10/1956 |
42425 |
Transfer out to: |
5C |
Stafford |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
06/10/1956 |
42450 |
Transfer out to: |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
06/10/1956 |
42451 |
Transfer out to: |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
06/10/1956 |
42461 |
Transfer out to: |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
06/10/1956 |
42540 |
Transfer out to: |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
06/10/1956 |
42563 |
Transfer out to: |
10C |
Patricroft |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
06/10/1956 |
42568 |
Transfer out to: |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
06/10/1956 |
42587 |
Transfer out to: |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
06/10/1956 |
42610 |
Transfer out to: |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
06/10/1956 |
42660 |
Transfer out to: |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
06/10/1956 |
46459 |
Transfer out to: |
3A |
Bescot |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
03/11/1956 |
42315 |
Transfer in from: |
5D |
Stoke |
|
|
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
24/11/1956 |
12070 |
Transfer in from: |
2A |
Rugby |
|
|
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
01/12/1956 |
12071 |
Transfer in from: |
2A |
Rugby |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
01/12/1956 |
42445 |
Transfer in from: |
8E |
Brunswick |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
01/12/1956 |
13177 |
Transfer out to: |
2A |
Rugby |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
01/12/1956 |
13178 |
Transfer out to: |
2A |
Rugby |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
m/e |
01/1957 |
75053 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
26/01/1957 |
42445 |
Transfer out to: |
8E |
Brunswick |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
26/01/1957 |
45441 |
Transfer out to: |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
|
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
23/02/1957 |
12082 |
Transfer in from: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
23/02/1957 |
42303 |
Transfer in from: |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
23/02/1957 |
42308 |
Transfer in from: |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 Tank |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
23/02/1957 |
80063 |
Transfer out to: |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 Tank |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
23/02/1957 |
80086 |
Transfer out to: |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
18/05/1957 |
44911 |
Transfer in from: |
34A |
Kings Cross |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
18/05/1957 |
73071 |
Transfer in from: |
34A |
Kings Cross |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
18/05/1957 |
75031 |
Transfer out to: |
6H |
Bangor |
|
|
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
22/06/1957 |
12036 |
Transfer in from: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
22/06/1957 |
12037 |
Transfer in from: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
22/06/1957 |
12070 |
Transfer out to: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
22/06/1957 |
75033 |
Transfer out to: |
6K |
Rhyl |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
10/08/1957 |
42416 |
Transfer in from: |
6H |
Bangor |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 2 |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
10/08/1957 |
78057 |
Transfer in from: |
6K |
Rhyl |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 Tank |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
10/08/1957 |
80040 |
Transfer in from: |
1E |
Bletchley |
|
|
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
10/08/1957 |
12071 |
Transfer out to: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
10/08/1957 |
12082 |
Transfer out to: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Steam |
2P |
4-4-0 |
4w/e |
10/08/1957 |
40580 |
Transfer out to: |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
|
Steam |
2P |
4-4-0 |
4w/e |
10/08/1957 |
40675 |
Transfer out to: |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
|
Steam |
2P |
4-4-0 |
4w/e |
10/08/1957 |
40679 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
Compound |
4-4-0 |
4w/e |
10/08/1957 |
41120 |
Transfer out to: |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
|
Steam |
Compound |
4-4-0 |
4w/e |
10/08/1957 |
41164 |
Transfer out to: |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
10/08/1957 |
42303 |
Transfer out to: |
6D |
Chester Northgate |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
10/08/1957 |
42308 |
Transfer out to: |
6D |
Chester Northgate |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
10/08/1957 |
44911 |
Transfer out to: |
3A |
Bescot |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
10/08/1957 |
75032 |
Transfer out to: |
6H |
Bangor |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
10/08/1957 |
75034 |
Transfer out to: |
6K |
Rhyl |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
10/08/1957 |
75035 |
Transfer out to: |
6H |
Bangor |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
07/09/1957 |
44911 |
Transfer in from: |
3A |
Bescot |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
16/09/1957 |
75033 |
Transfer in from: |
6K |
Rhyl |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
8w/e |
05/10/1957 |
42431 |
Transfer in from: |
5D |
Stoke |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
8w/e |
05/10/1957 |
75014 |
Transfer in from: |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
8w/e |
05/10/1957 |
75031 |
Transfer in from: |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
8w/e |
05/10/1957 |
75050 |
Transfer in from: |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
|
Steam |
2F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
30/11/1957 |
58293 |
Transfer in from: |
11B |
Barrow in Furness |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 Tank |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
30/11/1957 |
80091 |
Transfer in from: |
6H |
Bangor |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 Tank |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
30/11/1957 |
80092 |
Transfer in from: |
6H |
Bangor |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
30/11/1957 |
42315 |
Transfer out to: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
30/11/1957 |
42416 |
Transfer out to: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 2 |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
30/11/1957 |
78057 |
Transfer out to: |
6H |
Bangor |
|
|
Steam |
483 |
4-4-0 |
w/e |
21/12/1957 |
40559 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Compound |
4-4-0 |
4w/e |
28/12/1957 |
41157 |
Transfer out to: |
17F |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
|
Steam |
2441 |
0-6-0T |
4w/e |
25/01/1958 |
47207 |
Transfer in from: |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Steam |
2441 |
0-6-0T |
4w/e |
25/01/1958 |
47208 |
Transfer in from: |
15A |
Wellingborough |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 Tank |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
22/02/1958 |
80086 |
Transfer in from: |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 Tank |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
22/02/1958 |
80062 |
Transfer out to: |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
19/04/1958 |
42427 |
Transfer in from: |
11B |
Barrow in Furness |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
17/05/1958 |
42544 |
Transfer in from: |
2A |
Rugby |
|
|
Steam |
1142 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
17/05/1958 |
58171 |
Transfer in from: |
6K |
Rhyl |
|
|
Steam |
Compound |
4-4-0 |
4w/e |
17/05/1958 |
41106 |
Transfer out to: |
24J |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
17/05/1958 |
42427 |
Transfer out to: |
11B |
Workington |
|
|
Steam |
2F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
17/05/1958 |
58293 |
Transfer out to: |
6K |
Rhyl |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 Tank |
2-6-4T |
on |
17/05/1958 |
80059 |
Transfer out to: |
6H |
Bangor |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
14/06/1958 |
75053 |
Transfer out to: |
6K |
Rhyl |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
04/10/1958 |
45041 |
Transfer in from: |
26F |
Patricroft |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
04/10/1958 |
45042 |
Transfer in from: |
7A |
Llandudno Junction |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
04/10/1958 |
75034 |
Transfer in from: |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
04/10/1958 |
75035 |
Transfer in from: |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
04/10/1958 |
75051 |
Transfer in from: |
6K |
Rhyl |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
04/10/1958 |
75053 |
Transfer in from: |
6K |
Rhyl |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
04/10/1958 |
75054 |
Transfer in from: |
6K |
Rhyl |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
08/11/1958 |
45339 |
Transfer in from: |
25B |
Huddersfield Hillhouse |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
22/11/1958 |
47269 |
Transfer in from: |
2A |
Rugby |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
22/11/1958 |
73072 |
Transfer out to: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Steam |
0F |
0-4-0ST |
w/e |
29/11/1958 |
47006 |
Transfer in from: |
6H |
Bangor |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
06/12/1958 |
47269 |
Transfer out to: |
2A |
Rugby |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
13/12/1958 |
47371 |
Transfer in from: |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
|
Steam |
2441 |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
24/01/1959 |
47208 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
04 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
04/04/1959 |
11114 |
Transfer in from: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
04/04/1959 |
12053 |
Transfer in from: |
2A |
Rugby |
|
|
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
04/04/1959 |
12054 |
Transfer in from: |
2A |
Rugby |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
on |
25/04/1959 |
D3764 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
1142 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
09/05/1959 |
58171 |
Transfer out to: |
2A |
Rugby |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
15/06/1959 |
75033 |
Transfer out to: |
6K |
Rhyl |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
20/06/1959 |
42482 |
Transfer in from: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
20/06/1959 |
42544 |
Transfer out to: |
6H |
Bangor |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
20/06/1959 |
45042 |
Transfer out to: |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
|
Steam |
0F |
0-4-0ST |
w/e |
20/06/1959 |
47006 |
Transfer out to: |
8D |
Widnes |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
20/06/1959 |
75014 |
Transfer out to: |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
20/06/1959 |
75031 |
Transfer out to: |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
|
Steam |
0F |
0-4-0ST |
w/e |
22/08/1959 |
47006 |
Transfer in from: |
8D |
Widnes |
|
|
Steam |
Compound |
4-4-0 |
on |
22/08/1959 |
41158 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
29/08/1959 |
D3764 |
Transfer out to: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
29/08/1959 |
D3764 |
Transfer in from: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
12/09/1959 |
75013 |
Transfer in from: |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
12/09/1959 |
75014 |
Transfer in from: |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
12/09/1959 |
75031 |
Transfer in from: |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
12/09/1959 |
75032 |
Transfer in from: |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
19/09/1959 |
45237 |
Transfer in from: |
6E |
Chester West |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
26/09/1959 |
73013 |
Transfer in from: |
84K |
Chester West |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
26/09/1959 |
73033 |
Transfer in from: |
6E |
Chester West |
|
|
Steam |
Britannia |
4-6-2 |
w/e |
07/11/1959 |
70045 |
Transfer in from: |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
|
Steam |
Britannia |
4-6-2 |
w/e |
07/11/1959 |
70049 |
Transfer in from: |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
07/11/1959 |
45237 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
07/11/1959 |
45339 |
Transfer out to: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Steam |
0F |
0-4-0ST |
w/e |
21/11/1959 |
47006 |
Transfer out to: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
Britannia |
4-6-2 |
w/e |
21/11/1959 |
70045 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
Britannia |
4-6-2 |
w/e |
21/11/1959 |
70049 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
2P |
4-4-0 |
w/e |
21/11/1959 |
40658 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
05/12/1959 |
42079 |
Transfer in from: |
73F |
Ashford |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
12/12/1959 |
42079 |
Transfer out to: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 Tank |
2-6-4T |
5w/e |
31/12/1959 |
80040 |
Transfer out to: |
73F |
Ashford |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
09/01/1960 |
42417 |
Transfer in from: |
6D |
Chester Northgate |
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
09/01/1960 |
46472 |
Transfer in from: |
2A |
Rugby |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
09/01/1960 |
44911 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
09/01/1960 |
45041 |
Transfer out to: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
09/01/1960 |
45312 |
Transfer out to: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
06/02/1960 |
42198 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
06/02/1960 |
42202 |
Transfer in from: |
60B |
Aviemore |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
06/02/1960 |
42212 |
Transfer in from: |
67D |
Ardrossan |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
06/02/1960 |
42213 |
Transfer in from: |
68D |
Beattock |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
06/02/1960 |
42217 |
Transfer in from: |
64D |
Carstairs |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
06/02/1960 |
42229 |
Transfer in from: |
67A |
Corkerhill |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
06/02/1960 |
42236 |
Transfer in from: |
66D |
Greenock Ladyburn |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
06/02/1960 |
42238 |
Transfer in from: |
67A |
Corkerhill |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
06/02/1960 |
42240 |
Transfer in from: |
67A |
Corkerhill |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
06/02/1960 |
42247 |
Transfer in from: |
67A |
Corkerhill |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
06/02/1960 |
42270 |
Transfer in from: |
67A |
Corkerhill |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
06/02/1960 |
73004 |
Transfer in from: |
41C |
Sheffield Millhouses |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
06/02/1960 |
73048 |
Transfer in from: |
19B |
Sheffield Millhouses |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
27/02/1960 |
44710 |
Transfer out to: |
3D |
Aston |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
27/02/1960 |
44910 |
Transfer out to: |
3D |
Aston |
|
|
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
05/03/1960 |
12048 |
Transfer in from: |
2A |
Rugby |
|
|
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
05/03/1960 |
12057 |
Transfer in from: |
2A |
Rugby |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 Tank |
2-6-4T |
on |
11/03/1960 |
80047 |
Transfer out to: |
67A |
Corkerhill |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
12/03/1960 |
47374 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
w/e |
09/04/1960 |
3630 |
Transfer in from: |
84K |
Chester West |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
w/e |
09/04/1960 |
3665 |
Transfer in from: |
CHR |
Chester West |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
w/e |
09/04/1960 |
3676 |
Transfer in from: |
6E |
Chester West |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
w/e |
09/04/1960 |
3786 |
Transfer in from: |
CHR |
Chester West |
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
w/e |
09/04/1960 |
40106 |
Transfer in from: |
6E |
Chester West |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
w/e |
09/04/1960 |
4602 |
Transfer in from: |
84K |
Chester West |
|
|
Steam |
43xx |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
09/04/1960 |
5399 |
Transfer in from: |
84K |
Chester West |
|
|
Steam |
43xx |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
09/04/1960 |
6380 |
Transfer in from: |
CHR |
Chester West |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
09/04/1960 |
73014 |
Transfer in from: |
6E |
Chester West |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
09/04/1960 |
73038 |
Transfer in from: |
84K |
Chester West |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
w/e |
09/04/1960 |
7762 |
Transfer in from: |
6E |
Chester West |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 3 Tank |
2-6-2T |
w/e |
09/04/1960 |
82001 |
Transfer in from: |
6E |
Chester West |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 3 Tank |
2-6-2T |
w/e |
09/04/1960 |
82002 |
Transfer in from: |
6E |
Chester West |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 3 Tank |
2-6-2T |
w/e |
09/04/1960 |
82003 |
Transfer in from: |
6E |
Chester West |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 3 Tank |
2-6-2T |
w/e |
09/04/1960 |
82005 |
Transfer in from: |
6E |
Chester West |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 3 Tank |
2-6-2T |
w/e |
09/04/1960 |
82032 |
Transfer in from: |
6E |
Chester West |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 3 Tank |
2-6-2T |
w/e |
09/04/1960 |
82034 |
Transfer in from: |
6E |
Chester West |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 3 Tank |
2-6-2T |
w/e |
09/04/1960 |
82036 |
Transfer in from: |
6E |
Chester West |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
w/e |
09/04/1960 |
8709 |
Transfer in from: |
6E |
Chester West |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
w/e |
09/04/1960 |
8729 |
Transfer in from: |
84K |
Chester West |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
w/e |
09/04/1960 |
8730 |
Transfer in from: |
84K |
Chester West |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
w/e |
09/04/1960 |
9728 |
Transfer in from: |
CHR |
Chester West |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
w/e |
09/04/1960 |
9794 |
Transfer in from: |
CHR |
Chester West |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
09/04/1960 |
75013 |
Transfer out to: |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
09/04/1960 |
75014 |
Transfer out to: |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
09/04/1960 |
75031 |
Transfer out to: |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 Tank |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
09/04/1960 |
80052 |
Transfer out to: |
67A |
Corkerhill |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 Tank |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
09/04/1960 |
80092 |
Transfer out to: |
63A |
Perth South |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 Tank |
2-6-4T |
on |
11/04/1960 |
80050 |
Transfer out to: |
67A |
Corkerhill |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 Tank |
2-6-4T |
on |
22/04/1960 |
80048 |
Transfer out to: |
67A |
Corkerhill |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 2 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
30/04/1960 |
78018 |
Transfer in from: |
51H |
Kirkby Stephen |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 2 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
30/04/1960 |
78032 |
Transfer in from: |
12D |
Kirkby Stephen |
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
30/04/1960 |
46472 |
Transfer out to: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 Tank |
2-6-4T |
on |
05/05/1960 |
80049 |
Transfer out to: |
67A |
Corkerhill |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 Tank |
2-6-4T |
on |
07/05/1960 |
80045 |
Transfer out to: |
67A |
Corkerhill |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 Tank |
2-6-4T |
on |
07/05/1960 |
80051 |
Transfer out to: |
67A |
Corkerhill |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 Tank |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
07/05/1960 |
80053 |
Transfer out to: |
67A |
Corkerhill |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 Tank |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
07/05/1960 |
80086 |
Transfer out to: |
64C |
Dalry Road |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 Tank |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
07/05/1960 |
80091 |
Transfer out to: |
62B |
Dundee Tay Bridge |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
w/e |
14/05/1960 |
3630 |
Transfer out to: |
84J |
Croes Newydd |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
w/e |
14/05/1960 |
3665 |
Transfer out to: |
84J |
Croes Newydd |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
w/e |
14/05/1960 |
3676 |
Transfer out to: |
84J |
Croes Newydd |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
w/e |
14/05/1960 |
3786 |
Transfer out to: |
84J |
Croes Newydd |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
w/e |
14/05/1960 |
4602 |
Transfer out to: |
84J |
Croes Newydd |
|
|
Steam |
43xx |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
14/05/1960 |
5399 |
Transfer out to: |
84J |
Croes Newydd |
|
|
Steam |
43xx |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
14/05/1960 |
6380 |
Transfer out to: |
84J |
Croes Newydd |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
14/05/1960 |
73004 |
Transfer out to: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
14/05/1960 |
73013 |
Transfer out to: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
14/05/1960 |
73014 |
Transfer out to: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
14/05/1960 |
73033 |
Transfer out to: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
w/e |
14/05/1960 |
7762 |
Transfer out to: |
84J |
Croes Newydd |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
w/e |
14/05/1960 |
8709 |
Transfer out to: |
84J |
Croes Newydd |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
w/e |
14/05/1960 |
8729 |
Transfer out to: |
84J |
Croes Newydd |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
w/e |
14/05/1960 |
8730 |
Transfer out to: |
84J |
Croes Newydd |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
w/e |
14/05/1960 |
9794 |
Transfer out to: |
84J |
Croes Newydd |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
w/e |
21/05/1960 |
9728 |
Transfer out to: |
88E |
Abercynon |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
11/06/1960 |
44869 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 2 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
13/06/1960 |
78032 |
Transfer in from: |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 2 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
13/06/1960 |
78033 |
Transfer in from: |
8D |
Widnes |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 2 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
13/06/1960 |
78032 |
Transfer out to: |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
18/06/1960 |
42217 |
Transfer out to: |
24L |
Carnforth |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
18/06/1960 |
42238 |
Transfer out to: |
12G |
Oxenholme |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
18/06/1960 |
42247 |
Transfer out to: |
6H |
Bangor |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
18/06/1960 |
42270 |
Transfer out to: |
6H |
Bangor |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
18/06/1960 |
75053 |
Transfer out to: |
6K |
Rhyl |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
18/06/1960 |
75054 |
Transfer out to: |
6K |
Rhyl |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
30/07/1960 |
42209 |
Transfer in from: |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
m/e |
08/1960 |
47600 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
06/08/1960 |
42247 |
Transfer in from: |
6H |
Bangor |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
06/08/1960 |
42270 |
Transfer in from: |
6H |
Bangor |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
06/08/1960 |
42431 |
Transfer out to: |
6H |
Bangor |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
06/08/1960 |
42482 |
Transfer out to: |
6H |
Bangor |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
20/08/1960 |
42182 |
Transfer in from: |
21A |
Saltley |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
20/08/1960 |
42431 |
Transfer in from: |
6H |
Bangor |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
20/08/1960 |
42482 |
Transfer in from: |
6H |
Bangor |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
20/08/1960 |
42417 |
Transfer out to: |
21A |
Saltley |
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
17/09/1960 |
46420 |
Transfer in from: |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
24/09/1960 |
13176 |
Transfer in from: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
15/10/1960 |
47648 |
Transfer in from: |
5C |
Stafford |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
12/11/1960 |
D3851 |
Transfer in from: |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
03/12/1960 |
D3851 |
Transfer out to: |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
03/12/1960 |
42182 |
Transfer out to: |
87E |
Landore |
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
w/e |
10/12/1960 |
40106 |
Transfer out to: |
24K |
Preston |
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
10/12/1960 |
46420 |
Transfer out to: |
2B |
Nuneaton |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
14/01/1961 |
42061 |
Transfer in from: |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
14/01/1961 |
42463 |
Transfer in from: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
14/01/1961 |
42538 |
Transfer in from: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
11/04/1961 |
44869 |
Transfer out to: |
2E |
Northampton |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
22/04/1961 |
42198 |
Transfer out to: |
5D |
Stoke |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
22/04/1961 |
42202 |
Transfer out to: |
5D |
Stoke |
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
on |
23/04/1961 |
40085 |
Transfer in from: |
84D |
Leamington |
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
on |
23/04/1961 |
40086 |
Transfer in from: |
89A |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
on |
23/04/1961 |
40098 |
Transfer in from: |
82G |
Templecombe (S&D) |
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
on |
23/04/1961 |
40110 |
Transfer in from: |
84G |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
on |
23/04/1961 |
40126 |
Transfer in from: |
82G |
Templecombe (S&D) |
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
on |
23/04/1961 |
40171 |
Transfer in from: |
82G |
Templecombe (S&D) |
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
on |
23/04/1961 |
40205 |
Transfer in from: |
84G |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 3 Tank |
2-6-2T |
on |
23/04/1961 |
82001 |
Transfer out to: |
82G |
Templecombe (S&D) |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 3 Tank |
2-6-2T |
on |
23/04/1961 |
82002 |
Transfer out to: |
82G |
Templecombe (S&D) |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 3 Tank |
2-6-2T |
on |
23/04/1961 |
82003 |
Transfer out to: |
82E |
Bristol Barrow Road |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 3 Tank |
2-6-2T |
on |
23/04/1961 |
82005 |
Transfer out to: |
89A |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 3 Tank |
2-6-2T |
on |
23/04/1961 |
82032 |
Transfer out to: |
89A |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 3 Tank |
2-6-2T |
on |
23/04/1961 |
82034 |
Transfer out to: |
89C |
Machynlleth |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 3 Tank |
2-6-2T |
on |
23/04/1961 |
82036 |
Transfer out to: |
89C |
Machynlleth |
|
|
Diesel |
03 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
13/05/1961 |
D2386 |
Transfer in from: |
6F |
Bidston |
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
w/e |
13/05/1961 |
40106 |
Transfer in from: |
24K |
Preston |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
20/05/1961 |
42198 |
Transfer in from: |
5D |
Stoke |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
20/05/1961 |
42202 |
Transfer in from: |
5D |
Stoke |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
20/05/1961 |
47648 |
Transfer out to: |
|
Crewe Works |
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
on |
20/05/1961 |
40126 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
on |
20/05/1961 |
40171 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
10/06/1961 |
42950 |
Transfer in from: |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
10/06/1961 |
42971 |
Transfer in from: |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
10/06/1961 |
42982 |
Transfer in from: |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
10/06/1961 |
45149 |
Transfer in from: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
w/e |
10/06/1961 |
40110 |
Transfer out to: |
6H |
Bangor |
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
w/e |
10/06/1961 |
40205 |
Transfer out to: |
6H |
Bangor |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
10/06/1961 |
75034 |
Transfer out to: |
6K |
Rhyl |
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
w/e |
17/06/1961 |
40086 |
Transfer out to: |
8E |
Northwich |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
17/06/1961 |
47375 |
Transfer out to: |
24L |
Carnforth |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
17/06/1961 |
47383 |
Transfer out to: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
24/06/1961 |
47648 |
Transfer in from: |
|
Crewe Works |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
22/07/1961 |
47648 |
Transfer out to: |
12E |
Barrow in Furness |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
10/08/1961 |
42967 |
Transfer in from: |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
w/e |
12/08/1961 |
40086 |
Transfer in from: |
8E |
Northwich |
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
w/e |
26/08/1961 |
40086 |
Transfer out to: |
24L |
Carnforth |
|
|
Diesel |
03 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
02/09/1961 |
D2385 |
Transfer in from: |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Diesel |
04 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
09/09/1961 |
D2218 |
Transfer in from: |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
|
Diesel |
04 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
09/09/1961 |
D2220 |
Transfer in from: |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
|
Diesel |
03 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
16/09/1961 |
D2385 |
Transfer out to: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
14/10/1961 |
42950 |
Transfer out to: |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
14/10/1961 |
42971 |
Transfer out to: |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Diesel |
09 |
0-6-0 |
on |
07/11/1961 |
D4105 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
03 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
02/12/1961 |
D2386 |
Transfer out to: |
21E |
Monument Lane |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
10/03/1962 |
45149 |
Transfer out to: |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
10/03/1962 |
75039 |
Transfer out to: |
1E |
Bletchley |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
21/04/1962 |
47504 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
05/05/1962 |
42781 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
05/05/1962 |
42933 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
05/05/1962 |
42934 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
09/06/1962 |
73033 |
Transfer in from: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
16/06/1962 |
42783 |
Transfer in from: |
2D |
Nuneaton |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
16/06/1962 |
42811 |
Transfer in from: |
2B |
Nuneaton |
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
w/e |
16/06/1962 |
40085 |
Transfer out to: |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
w/e |
16/06/1962 |
40098 |
Transfer out to: |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
w/e |
16/06/1962 |
40106 |
Transfer out to: |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
16/06/1962 |
42967 |
Transfer out to: |
2B |
Nuneaton |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
16/06/1962 |
42982 |
Transfer out to: |
2B |
Nuneaton |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
16/06/1962 |
73033 |
Transfer out to: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
on |
17/06/1962 |
42538 |
Transfer out to: |
33C |
Shoeburyness |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
23/06/1962 |
42681 |
Transfer in from: |
33C |
Shoeburyness |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
23/06/1962 |
44780 |
Transfer in from: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
23/06/1962 |
44916 |
Transfer in from: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
23/06/1962 |
45256 |
Transfer in from: |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
23/06/1962 |
45332 |
Transfer in from: |
21C |
Bushbury |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
23/06/1962 |
42061 |
Transfer out to: |
6H |
Bangor |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
23/06/1962 |
42198 |
Transfer out to: |
6H |
Bangor |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
23/06/1962 |
75032 |
Transfer out to: |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
23/06/1962 |
75035 |
Transfer out to: |
6K |
Rhyl |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
23/06/1962 |
75050 |
Transfer out to: |
6H |
Bangor |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
23/06/1962 |
75051 |
Transfer out to: |
1E |
Bletchley |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 2 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
23/06/1962 |
78018 |
Transfer out to: |
12F |
Workington |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
30/06/1962 |
42366 |
Transfer in from: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
14/07/1962 |
42811 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
28/07/1962 |
73033 |
Transfer in from: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
11/08/1962 |
73033 |
Transfer out to: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
25/08/1962 |
D3370 |
Transfer in from: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
15/09/1962 |
42783 |
Transfer out to: |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
15/09/1962 |
45332 |
Transfer out to: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 2 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
06/10/1962 |
78018 |
Transfer in from: |
12F |
Workington |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
13/10/1962 |
44916 |
Transfer out to: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
13/10/1962 |
45256 |
Transfer out to: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
17/11/1962 |
73038 |
Transfer out to: |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
01/12/1962 |
42781 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
22/12/1962 |
D3370 |
Transfer out to: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
12/01/1963 |
42934 |
Transfer out to: |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
26/01/1963 |
42933 |
Transfer out to: |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
26/01/1963 |
42270 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
09/02/1963 |
73067 |
Transfer in from: |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
16/02/1963 |
42209 |
Transfer out to: |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
16/02/1963 |
42482 |
Transfer out to: |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
23/02/1963 |
42431 |
Transfer out to: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
09/03/1963 |
46470 |
Transfer in from: |
1C |
Watford |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
09/03/1963 |
75010 |
Transfer in from: |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
09/03/1963 |
75012 |
Transfer in from: |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
06/04/1963 |
45403 |
Transfer in from: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
27/04/1963 |
45111 |
Transfer in from: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
27/04/1963 |
45427 |
Transfer in from: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
25/05/1963 |
46505 |
Transfer in from: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
25/05/1963 |
46506 |
Transfer in from: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
25/05/1963 |
73157 |
Transfer in from: |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
25/05/1963 |
73071 |
Transfer out to: |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 2 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
25/05/1963 |
78018 |
Transfer out to: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 2 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
25/05/1963 |
78033 |
Transfer out to: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
22/06/1963 |
45031 |
Transfer in from: |
2A |
Rugby |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
22/06/1963 |
45130 |
Transfer in from: |
2A |
Rugby |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
22/06/1963 |
45184 |
Transfer in from: |
2A |
Rugby |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
22/06/1963 |
45231 |
Transfer in from: |
2A |
Rugby |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
22/06/1963 |
45419 |
Transfer in from: |
2A |
Rugby |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
22/06/1963 |
45429 |
Transfer in from: |
2A |
Rugby |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
on |
29/06/1963 |
42681 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
20/07/1963 |
42350 |
Transfer in from: |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
20/07/1963 |
42482 |
Transfer in from: |
6H |
Bangor |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 2 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
07/09/1963 |
78032 |
Transfer out to: |
6H |
Bangor |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
02/11/1963 |
44844 |
Transfer in from: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
02/11/1963 |
45000 |
Transfer in from: |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
02/11/1963 |
45044 |
Transfer in from: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
02/11/1963 |
45198 |
Transfer in from: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
02/11/1963 |
45305 |
Transfer in from: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
02/11/1963 |
73048 |
Transfer out to: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
02/11/1963 |
73067 |
Transfer out to: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
02/11/1963 |
73070 |
Transfer out to: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
02/11/1963 |
73157 |
Transfer out to: |
1G |
Woodford Halse |
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
07/12/1963 |
46505 |
Transfer out to: |
2E |
Saltley |
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
07/12/1963 |
46506 |
Transfer out to: |
16D |
Nottingham |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
on |
18/01/1964 |
42229 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
on |
25/01/1964 |
42463 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
01/02/1964 |
42283 |
Transfer in from: |
6H |
Bangor |
|
|
Steam |
2441 |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
15/02/1964 |
47207 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
07/03/1964 |
45353 |
Transfer in from: |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
07/03/1964 |
45438 |
Transfer in from: |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
on |
11/04/1964 |
42366 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
06/06/1964 |
47297 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
13/06/1964 |
42283 |
Transfer out to: |
6H |
Bangor |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
20/06/1964 |
42252 |
Transfer in from: |
2F |
Woodford Halse |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
20/06/1964 |
44682 |
Transfer in from: |
24J |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
20/06/1964 |
44713 |
Transfer in from: |
2E |
Northampton |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
20/06/1964 |
45050 |
Transfer in from: |
2E |
Northampton |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
20/06/1964 |
45257 |
Transfer in from: |
5D |
Stoke |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
20/06/1964 |
45270 |
Transfer in from: |
1H |
Northampton |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
20/06/1964 |
47437 |
Transfer in from: |
16C |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
20/06/1964 |
42350 |
Transfer out to: |
5C |
Stafford |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
18/07/1964 |
45250 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
18/07/1964 |
45660 |
Transfer in from: |
89A |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
18/07/1964 |
46457 |
Transfer in from: |
21B |
Bescot |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
15/08/1964 |
42247 |
Transfer out to: |
5C |
Stafford |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
05/09/1964 |
45660 |
Transfer out to: |
6D |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
19/09/1964 |
44682 |
Transfer out to: |
5D |
Stoke |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
19/09/1964 |
44713 |
Transfer out to: |
5D |
Stoke |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
19/09/1964 |
45050 |
Transfer out to: |
5D |
Stoke |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
19/09/1964 |
45257 |
Transfer out to: |
5D |
Stoke |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
19/09/1964 |
45270 |
Transfer out to: |
5D |
Stoke |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
03/10/1964 |
42247 |
Transfer in from: |
5C |
Stafford |
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
24/10/1964 |
46457 |
Transfer out to: |
2L |
Leamington |
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
24/10/1964 |
46470 |
Transfer out to: |
2L |
Leamington |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
28/11/1964 |
44844 |
Transfer out to: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
05/12/1964 |
47437 |
Transfer out to: |
2K |
Bushbury |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
12/12/1964 |
45344 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
12/12/1964 |
12053 |
Transfer out to: |
1C |
Watford |
|
|
Diesel |
04 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
26/12/1964 |
D2213 |
Transfer out to: |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Diesel |
04 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
26/12/1964 |
D2218 |
Transfer out to: |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Diesel |
04 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
26/12/1964 |
D2220 |
Transfer out to: |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
06/02/1965 |
44780 |
Transfer out to: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
10/04/1965 |
44913 |
Transfer in from: |
7B |
Bangor |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
on |
24/04/1965 |
42482 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
on |
22/05/1965 |
42202 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
12/06/1965 |
42074 |
Transfer in from: |
6H |
Bangor |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
12/06/1965 |
42251 |
Transfer in from: |
6H |
Bangor |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
12/06/1965 |
42267 |
Transfer in from: |
6H |
Bangor |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
12/06/1965 |
42283 |
Transfer in from: |
6H |
Bangor |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
12/06/1965 |
42606 |
Transfer in from: |
6H |
Bangor |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
on |
20/06/1965 |
42109 |
Transfer in from: |
25F |
Low Moor |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
on |
20/06/1965 |
42477 |
Transfer in from: |
51A |
Darlington |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
on |
20/06/1965 |
42074 |
Transfer out to: |
56F |
Low Moor |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
on |
20/06/1965 |
42213 |
Transfer out to: |
51A |
Darlington |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
26/06/1965 |
42224 |
Transfer in from: |
5D |
Stoke |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
26/06/1965 |
42233 |
Transfer in from: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
26/06/1965 |
42212 |
Transfer out to: |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
26/06/1965 |
42240 |
Transfer out to: |
9K |
Bolton |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
26/06/1965 |
42247 |
Transfer out to: |
10A |
Carnforth |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
26/06/1965 |
42267 |
Transfer out to: |
12C |
Barrow in Furness |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
26/06/1965 |
42606 |
Transfer out to: |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
on |
26/06/1965 |
42109 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
on |
26/06/1965 |
42477 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
31/07/1965 |
76020 |
Transfer in from: |
5D |
Stoke |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
31/07/1965 |
76035 |
Transfer in from: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
07/08/1965 |
76052 |
Transfer in from: |
2E |
Saltley |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
07/08/1965 |
76095 |
Transfer in from: |
2J |
Aston |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
07/08/1965 |
45429 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
21/08/1965 |
42224 |
Transfer out to: |
10C |
Fleetwood |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
21/08/1965 |
42233 |
Transfer out to: |
12C |
Barrow in Furness |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
21/08/1965 |
42236 |
Transfer out to: |
12C |
Barrow in Furness |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
21/08/1965 |
42251 |
Transfer out to: |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
21/08/1965 |
42252 |
Transfer out to: |
9K |
Bolton |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
21/08/1965 |
42283 |
Transfer out to: |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
21/08/1965 |
45305 |
Transfer out to: |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
m/e |
09/1965 |
47371 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
11/09/1965 |
D1622 |
Transfer in from: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
18/09/1965 |
45184 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
02/10/1965 |
45111 |
Transfer out to: |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
02/10/1965 |
45130 |
Transfer out to: |
6C |
Croes Newydd |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
02/10/1965 |
45198 |
Transfer out to: |
6C |
Croes Newydd |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
02/10/1965 |
45344 |
Transfer out to: |
6C |
Croes Newydd |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
16/10/1965 |
47437 |
Transfer in from: |
2F |
Bescot |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
08/01/1966 |
75012 |
Transfer out to: |
6F |
Machynlleth |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
05/03/1966 |
75010 |
Transfer out to: |
6C |
Croes Newydd |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
12/03/1966 |
76044 |
Transfer in from: |
5D |
Stoke |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
19/03/1966 |
76047 |
Transfer in from: |
2F |
Bescot |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
16/04/1966 |
D1622 |
Transfer out to: |
WL |
Western Lines (LMR) |
|
|
Diesel |
D3/7 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
23/04/1966 |
12020 |
Transfer in from: |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
23/04/1966 |
D3802 |
Transfer in from: |
2G |
Ryecroft (Walsall) |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
23/04/1966 |
D3832 |
Transfer in from: |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
23/04/1966 |
D3833 |
Transfer in from: |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
23/04/1966 |
44917 |
Transfer in from: |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
23/04/1966 |
44971 |
Transfer in from: |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
23/04/1966 |
45325 |
Transfer in from: |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
23/04/1966 |
45369 |
Transfer in from: |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
23/04/1966 |
47598 |
Transfer in from: |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
23/04/1966 |
48090 |
Transfer in from: |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
23/04/1966 |
48253 |
Transfer in from: |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
23/04/1966 |
48458 |
Transfer in from: |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
23/04/1966 |
48632 |
Transfer in from: |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
23/04/1966 |
48655 |
Transfer in from: |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
23/04/1966 |
48697 |
Transfer in from: |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
23/04/1966 |
48723 |
Transfer in from: |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
23/04/1966 |
48754 |
Transfer in from: |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
23/04/1966 |
76036 |
Transfer in from: |
2C |
Stourbridge Junction |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
23/04/1966 |
45275 |
Transfer out to: |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
23/04/1966 |
76020 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
on |
24/04/1966 |
75033 |
Transfer in from: |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
30/04/1966 |
75046 |
Transfer in from: |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
30/04/1966 |
75048 |
Transfer in from: |
27A |
Bank Hall |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
30/04/1966 |
75060 |
Transfer in from: |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
07/05/1966 |
76035 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
21/05/1966 |
75033 |
Transfer out to: |
6C |
Croes Newydd |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
21/05/1966 |
75046 |
Transfer out to: |
6C |
Croes Newydd |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
21/05/1966 |
75048 |
Transfer out to: |
6C |
Croes Newydd |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
21/05/1966 |
75060 |
Transfer out to: |
6C |
Croes Newydd |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
m/e |
07/1966 |
47389 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
23/07/1966 |
47266 |
Transfer in from: |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
23/07/1966 |
47391 |
Transfer in from: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
23/07/1966 |
47507 |
Transfer in from: |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
23/07/1966 |
44971 |
Transfer out to: |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
23/07/1966 |
47598 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
m/e |
08/1966 |
45438 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
13/08/1966 |
47437 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
20/08/1966 |
45325 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
20/08/1966 |
45427 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
m/e |
09/1966 |
47507 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
10/09/1966 |
44840 |
Transfer in from: |
2D |
Banbury |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
10/09/1966 |
45089 |
Transfer in from: |
2D |
Banbury |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
10/09/1966 |
47673 |
Transfer in from: |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
10/09/1966 |
45403 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
10/09/1966 |
45419 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
10/09/1966 |
47266 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
m/e |
10/1966 |
45044 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
m/e |
10/1966 |
47391 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
01/10/1966 |
12077 |
Transfer in from: |
2G |
Ryecroft (Walsall) |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
01/10/1966 |
D3004 |
Transfer in from: |
84F |
Stourbridge Junction |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
08/10/1966 |
44766 |
Transfer in from: |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
08/10/1966 |
44875 |
Transfer in from: |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
08/10/1966 |
45042 |
Transfer in from: |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
08/10/1966 |
45064 |
Transfer in from: |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
08/10/1966 |
45277 |
Transfer in from: |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
08/10/1966 |
45282 |
Transfer in from: |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
08/10/1966 |
45298 |
Transfer in from: |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
08/10/1966 |
45345 |
Transfer in from: |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
08/10/1966 |
76044 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
12/11/1966 |
48253 |
Transfer out to: |
6C |
Croes Newydd |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
12/11/1966 |
48632 |
Transfer out to: |
6C |
Croes Newydd |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
12/11/1966 |
48697 |
Transfer out to: |
6C |
Croes Newydd |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
12/11/1966 |
47673 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
03/12/1966 |
76047 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
10/12/1966 |
44771 |
Transfer in from: |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
10/12/1966 |
44831 |
Transfer in from: |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
10/12/1966 |
45116 |
Transfer in from: |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
10/12/1966 |
45247 |
Transfer in from: |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
10/12/1966 |
45280 |
Transfer in from: |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
10/12/1966 |
76052 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
28/01/1967 |
76036 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
04/02/1967 |
76037 |
Transfer in from: |
2B |
Oxley |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
25/02/1967 |
76088 |
Transfer in from: |
2B |
Oxley |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
25/02/1967 |
45277 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
04/03/1967 |
45369 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
04/03/1967 |
76095 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
11/03/1967 |
44661 |
Transfer in from: |
6D |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
11/03/1967 |
44805 |
Transfer in from: |
2B |
Oxley |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
11/03/1967 |
44876 |
Transfer in from: |
2B |
Oxley |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
11/03/1967 |
44944 |
Transfer in from: |
2B |
Oxley |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
11/03/1967 |
45052 |
Transfer in from: |
6D |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
11/03/1967 |
48073 |
Transfer in from: |
2E |
Saltley |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
11/03/1967 |
48603 |
Transfer in from: |
2E |
Saltley |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
11/03/1967 |
48645 |
Transfer in from: |
2E |
Saltley |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
11/03/1967 |
76039 |
Transfer in from: |
2B |
Oxley |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
11/03/1967 |
76041 |
Transfer in from: |
2B |
Oxley |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
11/03/1967 |
D3004 |
Transfer out to: |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
11/03/1967 |
45282 |
Transfer out to: |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
11/03/1967 |
48655 |
Transfer out to: |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
11/03/1967 |
48723 |
Transfer out to: |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
11/03/1967 |
45064 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
11/03/1967 |
45250 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
18/03/1967 |
45031 |
Transfer out to: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
18/03/1967 |
44771 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
25/03/1967 |
48090 |
Transfer out to: |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
01/04/1967 |
45231 |
Transfer out to: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
01/04/1967 |
76041 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
08/04/1967 |
76037 |
Transfer out to: |
6C |
Croes Newydd |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
08/04/1967 |
76039 |
Transfer out to: |
6C |
Croes Newydd |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
08/04/1967 |
45247 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
08/04/1967 |
48073 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
08/04/1967 |
48458 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
15/04/1967 |
48018 |
Transfer in from: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
15/04/1967 |
48287 |
Transfer in from: |
6C |
Croes Newydd |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
15/04/1967 |
44661 |
Transfer out to: |
5D |
Stoke |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
15/04/1967 |
44805 |
Transfer out to: |
5D |
Stoke |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
15/04/1967 |
44840 |
Transfer out to: |
5D |
Stoke |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
15/04/1967 |
44876 |
Transfer out to: |
5D |
Stoke |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
15/04/1967 |
45052 |
Transfer out to: |
5D |
Stoke |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
22/04/1967 |
D3085 |
Transfer in from: |
2A |
Tyseley |
|
|
Diesel |
D3/7 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
29/04/1967 |
12020 |
Transfer out to: |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
29/04/1967 |
44766 |
Transfer out to: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
29/04/1967 |
44913 |
Transfer out to: |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
29/04/1967 |
44944 |
Transfer out to: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
29/04/1967 |
45089 |
Transfer out to: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
29/04/1967 |
45280 |
Transfer out to: |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
20/05/1967 |
44831 |
Transfer out to: |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
20/05/1967 |
45116 |
Transfer out to: |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
20/05/1967 |
45345 |
Transfer out to: |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
20/05/1967 |
44875 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
27/05/1967 |
45000 |
Transfer out to: |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
27/05/1967 |
48645 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
27/05/1967 |
48754 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
10/06/1967 |
44917 |
Transfer out to: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
10/06/1967 |
45042 |
Transfer out to: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
10/06/1967 |
45298 |
Transfer out to: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
10/06/1967 |
45353 |
Transfer out to: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
10/06/1967 |
48018 |
Transfer out to: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
10/06/1967 |
48287 |
Transfer out to: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
10/06/1967 |
48603 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
10/06/1967 |
76088 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
18/05/1968 |
12057 |
Transfer out to: |
8J |
Allerton |
|
|
Diesel |
09 |
0-6-0 |
2w/e |
23/09/1968 |
D4105 |
Transfer out to: |
70B |
Feltham |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
12/10/1968 |
D3046 |
Transfer in from: |
70B |
Feltham |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
19/10/1968 |
D3038 |
Transfer in from: |
2F |
Bescot |
|
|
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
on |
19/10/1968 |
12036 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
on |
19/10/1968 |
12037 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
09 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
16/11/1968 |
D4112 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe Diesel |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
16/11/1968 |
D4157 |
Transfer in from: |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Diesel |
09 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
07/12/1968 |
D4112 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe Diesel |
|
|
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
11/01/1969 |
12071 |
Transfer in from: |
2F |
Bescot |
|
|
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
on |
25/01/1969 |
12048 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
02 |
0-4-0 |
w/e |
06/06/1970 |
D2867 |
Transfer in from: |
8J |
Allerton |
|
|
Diesel |
02 |
0-4-0 |
w/e |
06/06/1970 |
D2867 |
Transfer out to: |
O/L |
|
|
|
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
on |
25/07/1970 |
12054 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
02 |
0-4-0 |
w/e |
22/08/1970 |
D2867 |
Transfer in from: |
O/L |
|
|
|
Diesel |
02 |
0-4-0 |
on |
12/09/1970 |
D2867 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
10/10/1970 |
12071 |
Transfer out to: |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
10/10/1970 |
D3832 |
Transfer out to: |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
10/10/1970 |
D4157 |
Transfer out to: |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
03/04/1971 |
12077 |
Transfer out to: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
08/05/1971 |
D3176 |
Transfer out to: |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
08/05/1971 |
D3764 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe Diesel |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
08/05/1971 |
D3833 |
Transfer out to: |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
18/12/1971 |
12074 |
Transfer in from: |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
2w/e |
01/01/1972 |
D3247 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe Diesel |
|
|
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1972 |
12074 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
05/02/1972 |
D3084 |
Transfer in from: |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
05/02/1972 |
D3247 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe Diesel |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
05/02/1972 |
D3802 |
Transfer out to: |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
21/10/1972 |
D3221 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe Diesel |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
21/10/1972 |
D3038 |
Transfer out to: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
24/11/1973 |
D3084 |
Transfer out to: |
HD |
Holyhead |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
23/03/1974 |
D3046 |
Transfer out to: |
TI |
Tinsley |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
on |
18/12/1977 |
08070 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
on |
19/12/1982 |
08153 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|