Depot: Chester West
Type | Class | Wheels | Period | Date | Number | Event | Code | Depot | Length of Stay | Notes |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | 3571 | 0-4-2T | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | 3578 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 3571 | 0-4-2T | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | 3579 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | 4386 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | 6308 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | 9769 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 3100/5100 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 14/12/1935 | 5117 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 3100/5100 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 14/12/1935 | 5149 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/01/1936 | 4930 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 11/01/1936 | 5150 | Transfer in from: | CHR | Chester West | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 11/01/1936 | 5189 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 3100/5100 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 11/01/1936 | 5117 | Transfer out to: | BHD | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | 2903 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | 2926 | Transfer in from: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | 4308 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | 6601 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/03/1936 | 2926 | Transfer out to: | SRD | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | m/e | 04/1937 | 4308 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3571 | 0-4-2T | m/e | 09/1942 | 3579 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3571 | 0-4-2T | m/e | 07/1945 | 3578 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3100/5100 | 2-6-2T | m/e | 04/1947 | 5149 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 1434 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 2262 | Snapshot | SRD | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 2513 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Aberdare | 2-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 2662 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 2721 | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 2778 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 2853 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 2883 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 2886 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 2903 | Snapshot | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 2915 | Snapshot | PPRD | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 2926 | Snapshot | SRD | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 2930 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 2953 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 2989 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 3366 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 3399 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 3665 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 3762 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 3786 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Star | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 4013 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 4386 | Snapshot | BHD | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 4918 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 4930 | Snapshot | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 4976 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3100/5100 | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 5137 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 5150 | Snapshot | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 5174 | Snapshot | LMTN | Leamington | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 5176 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 5179 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 5181 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 5184 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 5186 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 5189 | Snapshot | STB | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5344 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5399 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 5647 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 5690 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 5723 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 5725 | Snapshot | OXY | Oxley | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 5791 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5912 | Snapshot | CARM | Carmarthen | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5923 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5966 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 6308 | Snapshot | CHR | Chester West | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 6308 | Snapshot | CHR | Chester West | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 6311 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 6337 | Snapshot | BHD | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 6339 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 6380 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 6392 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 6601 | Snapshot | SPM | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 6624 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 6859 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 6941 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 7313 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 77115 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 8428 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 9728 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 9769 | Snapshot | OXY | Oxley | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 9774 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 9794 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 2721 | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 07/1947 | 2778 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 25/07/1947 | 5033 | Transfer in from: | SRD | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | m/e | 10/1947 | 3399 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8428 | Snapshot | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 24/01/1948 | 2882 | Transfer in from: | BAN | Banbury | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 13/02/1948 | 5033 | Transfer out to: | SRD | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | m/e | 04/1948 | 3366 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/04/1948 | 2886 | Transfer out to: | SALOP | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 31/05/1948 | 5033 | Transfer in from: | SRD | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/06/1948 | 2869 | Transfer in from: | BAN | Banbury | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/06/1948 | 2898 | Transfer in from: | BAN | Banbury | ||
Steam | 3100/5100 | 2-6-2T | m/e | 30/06/1948 | 5129 | Transfer in from: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 07/1948 | 5033 | Transfer in from: | CHR | Chester West | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 07/1948 | 5033 | Transfer out to: | CHR | Chester West | ||
Steam | Aberdare | 2-6-0 | on | 03/07/1948 | 2662 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/07/1948 | 6392 | Transfer out to: | CNYD | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 07/08/1948 | 78695 | Transfer in from: | OXY | Oxley | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 07/08/1948 | 79225 | Transfer in from: | OXY | Oxley | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/09/1948 | 6392 | Transfer in from: | CNYD | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 04/09/1948 | 2869 | Transfer out to: | BAN | Banbury | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 04/09/1948 | 2898 | Transfer out to: | BAN | Banbury | ||
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | m/e | 30/09/1948 | 2989 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | on | 14/10/1948 | 2890 | Transfer in from: | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | on | 14/10/1948 | 2883 | Transfer out to: | BAN | Banbury | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 25/12/1948 | 2810 | Transfer in from: | ABDR | Aberdare | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 25/12/1948 | 4076 | Transfer in from: | SRD | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/12/1948 | 4078 | Transfer in from: | LDR | Landore | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/01/1949 | 5075 | Transfer in from: | SRD | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 04/02/1949 | 4076 | Transfer out to: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 03/1949 | 4076 | Transfer in from: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/03/1949 | 6859 | Transfer out to: | BHD | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 28/03/1949 | 5075 | Transfer out to: | SDN | Swindon | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/05/1949 | 4124 | Transfer in from: | BHD | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/05/1949 | 2262 | Transfer out to: | CNYD | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/06/1949 | 5075 | Transfer in from: | SRD | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 18/06/1949 | 2853 | Transfer out to: | BAN | Banbury | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/07/1949 | 5075 | Transfer in from: | CHR | Chester West | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/07/1949 | 5075 | Transfer out to: | CHR | Chester West | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 16/07/1949 | 5103 | Transfer in from: | BHD | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 16/07/1949 | 4124 | Transfer out to: | BHD | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | 3100/5100 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 10/09/1949 | 5141 | Transfer in from: | STB | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | m/e | 10/1949 | 2930 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 08/10/1949 | 3619 | Transfer in from: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 03/12/1949 | 3859 | Transfer in from: | SHL | Southall | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/12/1949 | 6311 | Transfer out to: | CNYD | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/12/1949 | 7313 | Transfer out to: | CNYD | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1949 | 3858 | Transfer in from: | SHL | Southall | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1949 | 3860 | Transfer in from: | SHL | Southall | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 31/12/1949 | 3619 | Transfer out to: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/02/1950 | 4987 | Transfer in from: | OXY | Oxley | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 25/03/1950 | 3762 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 22/04/1950 | 3762 | Transfer in from: | 84A | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | Star | 4-6-0 | m/e | 05/1950 | 4013 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 20/05/1950 | 4617 | Transfer in from: | SLO | Slough | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 17/06/1950 | 2895 | Transfer in from: | OXY | Oxley | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/08/1950 | 4905 | Transfer in from: | SDN | Swindon | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 12/08/1950 | 2895 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 12/08/1950 | 5176 | Transfer out to: | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/08/1950 | 4905 | Transfer in from: | 84K | Chester West | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/08/1950 | 4905 | Transfer out to: | 84K | Chester West | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 30/09/1950 | 9425 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | m/e | 10/1950 | 2915 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/10/1950 | 7921 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/10/1950 | 7922 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 31/10/1950 | 8423 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/10/1950 | 7921 | Transfer in from: | 84K | Chester West | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/10/1950 | 7922 | Transfer in from: | 84K | Chester West | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/10/1950 | 7921 | Transfer out to: | 84K | Chester West | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/10/1950 | 7922 | Transfer out to: | 84K | Chester West | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 04/11/1950 | 5027 | Transfer in from: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 4617 | Transfer out to: | 84J | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 2869 | Transfer in from: | BAN | Banbury | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 5027 | Transfer in from: | 84K | Chester West | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 90685 | Transfer in from: | 84D | Leamington | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 4918 | Transfer out to: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 5027 | Transfer out to: | 84K | Chester West | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | w/e | 31/12/1950 | 2822 | Transfer in from: | CNYD | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 2869 | Transfer in from: | 84K | Chester West | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | w/e | 31/12/1950 | 3829 | Transfer in from: | BAN | Banbury | ||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | w/e | 31/12/1950 | 7823 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | w/e | 31/12/1950 | 7827 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 90685 | Transfer in from: | 84K | Chester West | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 2869 | Transfer out to: | 84K | Chester West | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | w/e | 31/12/1950 | 8423 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 90685 | Transfer out to: | 84K | Chester West | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 31/01/1951 | 2822 | Transfer in from: | 84K | Chester West | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 31/01/1951 | 3829 | Transfer in from: | 84K | Chester West | ||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/01/1951 | 7823 | Transfer in from: | 84K | Chester West | ||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/01/1951 | 7827 | Transfer in from: | 84K | Chester West | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 31/01/1951 | 2822 | Transfer out to: | 84K | Chester West | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 31/01/1951 | 3829 | Transfer out to: | 84K | Chester West | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 5923 | Transfer out to: | 84D | Leamington | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 5966 | Transfer out to: | 84D | Leamington | ||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/01/1951 | 7823 | Transfer out to: | 84K | Chester West | ||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/01/1951 | 7827 | Transfer out to: | 84K | Chester West | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 90685 | Transfer out to: | 84D | Leamington | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 7922 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 7922 | Transfer in from: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 05/1951 | 5061 | Transfer in from: | 84A | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 6683 | Transfer in from: | LDR | Landore | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 7922 | Transfer in from: | 84K | Chester West | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 2869 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 6624 | Transfer out to: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 7922 | Transfer out to: | 84K | Chester West | ||
Steam | 3100/5100 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 5137 | Transfer out to: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 9425 | Transfer out to: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | 3100/5100 | 2-6-2T | m/e | 07/1951 | 5129 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/07/1951 | 5061 | Transfer in from: | 84K | Chester West | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 14/07/1951 | 3860 | Transfer out to: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/07/1951 | 4987 | Transfer out to: | 84D | Leamington | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/07/1951 | 5061 | Transfer out to: | 84K | Chester West | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 8729 | Transfer in from: | BAN | Banbury | ||
Steam | 3100/5100 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 5141 | Transfer out to: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 31/08/1951 | 8729 | Transfer in from: | 84K | Chester West | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 31/08/1951 | 8729 | Transfer out to: | 84K | Chester West | ||
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | m/e | 09/1951 | 2926 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 3667 | Transfer in from: | STB | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 30/09/1951 | 3667 | Transfer in from: | 84K | Chester West | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 30/09/1951 | 3667 | Transfer out to: | 84K | Chester West | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 31/10/1951 | 5968 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | m/e | 31/10/1951 | 7823 | Transfer out to: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 03/11/1951 | 1022 | Transfer in from: | 83G | Penzance | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 06/11/1951 | 5027 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 01/12/1951 | 90149 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 3630 | Transfer in from: | BAN | Banbury | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 5994 | Transfer in from: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 6362 | Transfer in from: | OXY | Oxley | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 6901 | Transfer in from: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1951 | 90149 | Transfer in from: | 84K | Chester West | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1951 | 90149 | Transfer out to: | 84K | Chester West | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 3667 | Transfer out to: | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 31/01/1952 | 3630 | Transfer in from: | 84K | Chester West | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/01/1952 | 5994 | Transfer in from: | 84K | Chester West | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/01/1952 | 6362 | Transfer in from: | 84K | Chester West | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/01/1952 | 6901 | Transfer in from: | 84K | Chester West | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 31/01/1952 | 3630 | Transfer out to: | 84K | Chester West | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/01/1952 | 5994 | Transfer out to: | 84K | Chester West | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/01/1952 | 6362 | Transfer out to: | 84K | Chester West | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/01/1952 | 6901 | Transfer out to: | 84K | Chester West | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 31/01/1952 | 90149 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | m/e | 02/1952 | 2953 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 2882 | Transfer out to: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 29/02/1952 | 90466 | Transfer in from: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 5912 | Transfer out to: | 84J | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 90572 | Transfer out to: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 2w/e | 12/07/1952 | 6833 | Transfer in from: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 2w/e | 12/07/1952 | 6835 | Transfer in from: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 2w/e | 12/07/1952 | 6963 | Transfer in from: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2w/e | 12/07/1952 | 3829 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 2822 | Transfer out to: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | w/e | 06/09/1952 | 4602 | Transfer in from: | SALOP | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | w/e | 06/09/1952 | 9719 | Transfer in from: | SALOP | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 3859 | Transfer out to: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 9719 | Transfer out to: | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 1000 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 1008 | Transfer in from: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 1024 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 4165 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 7800 | Transfer in from: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 5994 | Transfer out to: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 5177 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 5399 | Transfer out to: | 84J | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 6308 | Transfer out to: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 6362 | Transfer out to: | 85C | Hereford | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 6683 | Transfer out to: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 6331 | Transfer in from: | CARM | Carmarthen | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 6344 | Transfer in from: | CARM | Carmarthen | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 5184 | Transfer out to: | 84D | Leamington | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 2822 | Transfer in from: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 6367 | Transfer in from: | CARM | Carmarthen | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 6393 | Transfer in from: | RDG | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 5311 | Transfer in from: | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 5334 | Transfer in from: | CNYD | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 5334 | Transfer out to: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 6339 | Transfer out to: | 82D | Westbury | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 6393 | Transfer out to: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 4115 | Transfer in from: | SRD | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 90466 | Transfer out to: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 9774 | Transfer out to: | 84H | Wellington | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/09/1953 | 5326 | Transfer in from: | SPM | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/09/1953 | 6345 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 4917 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 73020 | Transfer in from: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 73021 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 73023 | Transfer in from: | 10C | Patricroft | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 73024 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 73038 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 7801 | Transfer in from: | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 2810 | Transfer out to: | 86J | Aberdare | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 5181 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 4905 | Transfer out to: | 85C | Hereford | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 4976 | Transfer out to: | 85C | Hereford | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 7921 | Transfer out to: | 85C | Hereford | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/11/1953 | 4917 | Transfer out to: | 85C | Hereford | ||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/12/1953 | 7807 | Transfer in from: | OSY | Oswestry | ||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/12/1953 | 7820 | Transfer in from: | 89A | Oswestry | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/12/1953 | 7921 | Transfer in from: | 85C | Hereford | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 30/01/1954 | 3820 | Transfer in from: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/01/1954 | 4917 | Transfer in from: | 83C | Exeter | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/01/1954 | 5962 | Transfer in from: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 27/02/1954 | 5748 | Transfer in from: | OXY | Oxley | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/02/1954 | 4917 | Transfer out to: | 83C | Exeter | ||
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/03/1954 | 1026 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/03/1954 | 1000 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 27/03/1954 | 5748 | Transfer out to: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 7822 | Transfer in from: | 89A | Oswestry | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 2822 | Transfer out to: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 5326 | Transfer out to: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/06/1954 | 5315 | Transfer in from: | 84J | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/06/1954 | 6367 | Transfer out to: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/06/1954 | 6833 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 6367 | Transfer in from: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 6835 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 6806 | Transfer in from: | PZ | Penzance | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 6817 | Transfer in from: | PZ | Penzance | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 6849 | Transfer in from: | 86G | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 73020 | Transfer out to: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 73024 | Transfer out to: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 27/10/1954 | 4076 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 5690 | Transfer out to: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 5739 | Transfer in from: | SRD | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 2513 | Transfer out to: | 89B | Brecon | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 01/1955 | 4076 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/01/1955 | 7820 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 05/01/1955 | 4000 | Transfer in from: | SRD | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 31/01/1955 | 4000 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 01/02/1955 | 5031 | Transfer in from: | 84A | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 03/1955 | 5031 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 8w/e | 26/03/1955 | 1434 | Transfer out to: | 89C | Machynlleth | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/05/1955 | 4102 | Transfer in from: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 16/07/1955 | 2804 | Transfer in from: | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 16/07/1955 | 2817 | Transfer in from: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/07/1955 | 4377 | Transfer in from: | WES | Westbury | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/07/1955 | 5319 | Transfer in from: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/07/1955 | 73013 | Transfer in from: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/07/1955 | 6806 | Transfer out to: | 85C | Hereford | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/07/1955 | 6849 | Transfer out to: | 85C | Hereford | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 09/1955 | 5091 | Transfer in from: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 5399 | Transfer in from: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 6823 | Transfer in from: | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 6857 | Transfer in from: | STB | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 1026 | Transfer out to: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 2890 | Transfer out to: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/11/1955 | 4377 | Transfer out to: | 89C | Machynlleth | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/11/1955 | 5319 | Transfer out to: | 84J | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 6331 | Transfer out to: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1955 | 2804 | Transfer out to: | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1955 | 90652 | Transfer out to: | 25B | Huddersfield Hillhouse | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 25/02/1956 | 9740 | Transfer in from: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 9740 | Transfer out to: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 5968 | Transfer out to: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 05/1956 | 5075 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 5186 | Transfer out to: | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 5344 | Transfer out to: | 83C | Exeter | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 6337 | Transfer out to: | 83C | Exeter | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 6941 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 08/09/1956 | 5160 | Transfer in from: | STB | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 29/12/1956 | 2848 | Transfer in from: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 29/12/1956 | 2882 | Transfer in from: | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 29/12/1956 | 8730 | Transfer in from: | SPM | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 29/12/1956 | 5647 | Transfer out to: | 81E | Didcot | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 26/01/1957 | 3811 | Transfer in from: | 87F | Llanelli | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 3811 | Transfer out to: | 87F | Llanelli | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 8w/e | 20/04/1957 | 4128 | Transfer in from: | BHD | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 20/04/1957 | 6942 | Transfer in from: | 83E | St Blazey | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8w/e | 20/04/1957 | 3762 | Transfer out to: | 87B | Duffryn Yard | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 06/1957 | 5091 | Transfer out to: | 83C | Exeter | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 13/07/1957 | 5791 | Transfer out to: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 13/07/1957 | 6392 | Transfer out to: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 05/10/1957 | 2807 | Transfer in from: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 05/10/1957 | 2825 | Transfer in from: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 05/10/1957 | 2833 | Transfer in from: | OXY | Oxley | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 05/10/1957 | 2855 | Transfer in from: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/10/1957 | 6823 | Transfer out to: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/10/1957 | 6857 | Transfer out to: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 11/1957 | 5723 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 02/11/1957 | 5719 | Transfer in from: | STB | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 02/11/1957 | 4128 | Transfer out to: | 84D | Leamington | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 30/11/1957 | 4076 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 2834 | Transfer in from: | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 5311 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 5315 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 6344 | Transfer out to: | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 6367 | Transfer out to: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 27/01/1958 | 4078 | Transfer in from: | CHR | Chester West | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 27/01/1958 | 4078 | Transfer out to: | 84K | Chester West | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 12/06/1958 | 2807 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/06/1958 | 6817 | Transfer out to: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 48308 | Transfer in from: | 86G | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 48344 | Transfer in from: | 86G | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 48402 | Transfer in from: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 48408 | Transfer in from: | 86G | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 48412 | Transfer in from: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 48415 | Transfer in from: | 86G | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 48417 | Transfer in from: | 86G | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 48418 | Transfer in from: | 86G | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 48424 | Transfer in from: | 86G | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 48430 | Transfer in from: | 86G | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 48444 | Transfer in from: | 86G | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 48471 | Transfer in from: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 73033 | Transfer in from: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 1008 | Transfer out to: | 83G | Penzance | ||
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 1022 | Transfer out to: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 1024 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 2817 | Transfer out to: | 86G | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 2825 | Transfer out to: | 86G | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 2833 | Transfer out to: | 86G | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 2834 | Transfer out to: | 86G | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 2848 | Transfer out to: | 86G | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 2855 | Transfer out to: | 86G | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 2882 | Transfer out to: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 3820 | Transfer out to: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 3858 | Transfer out to: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1958 | 4078 | Transfer out to: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1958 | 5033 | Transfer out to: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/07/1958 | 45613 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/07/1958 | 45632 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/07/1958 | 6376 | Transfer in from: | BHD | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 09/08/1958 | 40116 | Transfer in from: | 22A | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 09/08/1958 | 82001 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 09/08/1958 | 82002 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 09/08/1958 | 82003 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 09/08/1958 | 82005 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 09/08/1958 | 82032 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 09/08/1958 | 82034 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 09/08/1958 | 82036 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 09/08/1958 | 4102 | Transfer out to: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 09/08/1958 | 4115 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 09/08/1958 | 4165 | Transfer out to: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 09/08/1958 | 5103 | Transfer out to: | 86G | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 09/08/1958 | 5160 | Transfer out to: | 83E | St Blazey | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 09/08/1958 | 5177 | Transfer out to: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 09/08/1958 | 5179 | Transfer out to: | 86F | Tondu | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 09/1958 | 5725 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 09/1958 | 5739 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 05/09/1958 | 5061 | Transfer out to: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 73014 | Transfer in from: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 73024 | Transfer in from: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 73025 | Transfer in from: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 73026 | Transfer in from: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 75005 | Transfer in from: | 89A | Oswestry | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 75006 | Transfer in from: | 89A | Oswestry | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 75020 | Transfer in from: | 89A | Oswestry | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 75026 | Transfer in from: | 89A | Oswestry | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 75028 | Transfer in from: | 89A | Oswestry | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 5962 | Transfer out to: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 6901 | Transfer out to: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 6942 | Transfer out to: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 6963 | Transfer out to: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 7800 | Transfer out to: | 89A | Oswestry | ||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 7801 | Transfer out to: | 89A | Oswestry | ||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 7807 | Transfer out to: | 89A | Oswestry | ||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 7822 | Transfer out to: | 89A | Oswestry | ||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 7827 | Transfer out to: | 89A | Oswestry | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 7921 | Transfer out to: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 7922 | Transfer out to: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 45624 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 73014 | Transfer in from: | 6E | Chester West | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 73024 | Transfer in from: | 6E | Chester West | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 73025 | Transfer in from: | 6E | Chester West | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 73098 | Transfer in from: | 10C | Patricroft | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 73099 | Transfer in from: | 10C | Patricroft | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 7762 | Transfer in from: | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 8709 | Transfer in from: | LLY | Llanelli | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 73014 | Transfer out to: | 6E | Chester West | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 73024 | Transfer out to: | 6E | Chester West | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 73025 | Transfer out to: | 6E | Chester West | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 11/1958 | 5719 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 01/11/1958 | 40106 | Transfer in from: | 6E | Wrexham Rhosddu | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 15/11/1958 | 48308 | Transfer out to: | 8D | Widnes | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/11/1958 | 73098 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/11/1958 | 73099 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | w/e | 06/12/1958 | 3676 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/12/1958 | 6376 | Transfer out to: | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 11/04/1959 | 45613 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 11/04/1959 | 45624 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 11/04/1959 | 45632 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 11/04/1959 | 48344 | Transfer out to: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 11/04/1959 | 48402 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 11/04/1959 | 48408 | Transfer out to: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 11/04/1959 | 48412 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 11/04/1959 | 48415 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 11/04/1959 | 48417 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 11/04/1959 | 48418 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 11/04/1959 | 48424 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 11/04/1959 | 48430 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 11/04/1959 | 48444 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 11/04/1959 | 48471 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 11/04/1959 | 73021 | Transfer out to: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 11/04/1959 | 73023 | Transfer out to: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 11/04/1959 | 73024 | Transfer out to: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 11/04/1959 | 73025 | Transfer out to: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 11/04/1959 | 73026 | Transfer out to: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 11/04/1959 | 75005 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 11/04/1959 | 75006 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 11/04/1959 | 75020 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 11/04/1959 | 75026 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 45237 | Transfer in from: | 2E | Northampton | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 40116 | Transfer out to: | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 75028 | Transfer out to: | 6K | Rhyl | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/07/1959 | 6345 | Transfer out to: | 87F | Llanelli | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 06/09/1959 | 75033 | Transfer in from: | 6K | Rhyl | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 12/09/1959 | 75028 | Transfer in from: | 6K | Rhyl | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 19/09/1959 | 45237 | Transfer out to: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 26/09/1959 | 73013 | Transfer out to: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 26/09/1959 | 73033 | Transfer out to: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | w/e | 09/04/1960 | 3630 | Transfer out to: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | w/e | 09/04/1960 | 3665 | Transfer out to: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | w/e | 09/04/1960 | 3676 | Transfer out to: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | w/e | 09/04/1960 | 3786 | Transfer out to: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 09/04/1960 | 40106 | Transfer out to: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | w/e | 09/04/1960 | 4602 | Transfer out to: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | w/e | 09/04/1960 | 5399 | Transfer out to: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | w/e | 09/04/1960 | 6380 | Transfer out to: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 09/04/1960 | 73014 | Transfer out to: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 09/04/1960 | 73038 | Transfer out to: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 09/04/1960 | 75028 | Transfer out to: | 11B | Workington | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 09/04/1960 | 75033 | Transfer out to: | 11B | Workington | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | w/e | 09/04/1960 | 7762 | Transfer out to: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | w/e | 09/04/1960 | 82001 | Transfer out to: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | w/e | 09/04/1960 | 82002 | Transfer out to: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | w/e | 09/04/1960 | 82003 | Transfer out to: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | w/e | 09/04/1960 | 82005 | Transfer out to: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | w/e | 09/04/1960 | 82032 | Transfer out to: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | w/e | 09/04/1960 | 82034 | Transfer out to: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | w/e | 09/04/1960 | 82036 | Transfer out to: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | w/e | 09/04/1960 | 8709 | Transfer out to: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | w/e | 09/04/1960 | 8729 | Transfer out to: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | w/e | 09/04/1960 | 8730 | Transfer out to: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 09/04/1960 | 90686 | Transfer out to: | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | w/e | 09/04/1960 | 9728 | Transfer out to: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | w/e | 09/04/1960 | 9794 | Transfer out to: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/05/1960 | 5174 | Transfer out to: | 83C | Exeter | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 24/11/1973 | D3194 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/03/1974 | D3031 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 23/08/1975 | 08036 | Transfer in from: | 6G | Llandudno Junction | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 23/08/1975 | 08126 | Transfer out to: | LJ | |||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/11/1975 | 08036 | Transfer out to: | CD | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 04/1977 | 08025 | Transfer in from: | BC | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 04/1977 | 08069 | Transfer in from: | BC | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 04/1977 | 08078 | Transfer in from: | 8H | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 04/1977 | 08079 | Transfer in from: | 8H | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 04/1977 | 08300 | Transfer in from: | BC | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 04/1977 | 08465 | Transfer in from: | BC | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 04/1977 | 08490 | Transfer in from: | 8H | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 04/1977 | 08665 | Transfer in from: | 8H | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 04/1977 | 08927 | Transfer in from: | 8H | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 09/1977 | 08300 | Transfer out to: | AN | Allerton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 10/1977 | 08025 | Transfer out to: | BS | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 10/1977 | 08465 | Transfer out to: | KD | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 09/1981 | 08078 | Transfer out to: | KD | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 27/02/1983 | 08069 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 25/09/1983 | 08023 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 04/12/1983 | 08079 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 18/12/1985 | 08490 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/06/2005 | 08927 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/09/2008 | 08665 | Condemned |