Depot: Colchester
Type | Class | Wheels | Period | Date | Number | Event | Code | Depot | Length of Stay | Notes |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | Y5 | 0-4-0ST | m/e | 04/1903 | 7231 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Y5 | 0-4-0ST | on | 16/07/1931 | 7231 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 15/09/1932 | 4631 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 19/02/1933 | 4667 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 26/03/1934 | 2724 | Transfer in from: | PKS | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 26/03/1934 | 4667 | Transfer out to: | PKS | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 03/04/1934 | 2722 | Transfer in from: | PKS | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 03/04/1934 | 4631 | Transfer out to: | PKS | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 26/01/1935 | 2723 | Transfer in from: | PKS | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 02/03/1935 | 2723 | Transfer out to: | PKS | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | m/e | 11/1935 | 4667 | Transfer in from: | PKS | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J70 | 0-6-0T | m/e | 11/1935 | 7139 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | m/e | 11/1935 | 7161 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | m/e | 11/1935 | 7164 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 05/11/1935 | 2720 | Transfer in from: | PKS | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 14/11/1935 | 4631 | Transfer in from: | PKS | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 19/11/1935 | 4667 | Transfer in from: | COL | Colchester | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 19/11/1935 | 4667 | Transfer out to: | COL | Colchester | ||
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | m/e | 12/1935 | 7169 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | J16 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 01/1936 | 8189 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | m/e | 01/1936 | 4631 | Transfer out to: | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | m/e | 01/1936 | 4667 | Transfer out to: | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/07/1936 | 2719 | Transfer in from: | PKS | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 25/09/1939 | 2703 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 25/09/1939 | 2714 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 25/09/1939 | 2777 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 25/09/1939 | 2719 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 25/09/1939 | 2720 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 25/09/1939 | 2722 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 03/12/1939 | 2719 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 03/12/1939 | 2720 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 03/12/1939 | 2703 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 03/12/1939 | 2714 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 03/12/1939 | 2724 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 03/12/1939 | 2777 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 20/07/1941 | 2716 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 20/07/1941 | 2720 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 03/08/1941 | 2720 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 03/08/1941 | 2716 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 02/11/1941 | 2719 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 11/01/1946 | 4667 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 12/01/1946 | 4669 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 12/01/1946 | 4676 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 13/01/1946 | 4671 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 13/01/1946 | 4675 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 19/01/1946 | 2720 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 07/12/1946 | 1759 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 28/12/1946 | 1759 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 25/09/1947 | 1759 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 25/09/1947 | 1761 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 25/09/1947 | 1765 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1512 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1523 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1553 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | B2 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1607 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2519 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2523 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2565 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2598 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2608 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2609 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2617 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | B2 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2803 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | B2 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2814 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | B2 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2815 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | B2 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2816 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | B2 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2832 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5357 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5374 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5384 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5385 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5414 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5424 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5432 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5440 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5443 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5445 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5448 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5456 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5465 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5473 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5522 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5531 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J16 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5539 | Snapshot | COL | Colchester | ||
Steam | J16 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5539 | Snapshot | COL | Colchester | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5543 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5564 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | F5 | 2-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7188 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | F5 | 2-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7189 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | F5 | 2-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7190 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | F5 | 2-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7207 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | F5 | 2-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7213 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J70 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8219 | Snapshot | IPS | Ipswich | ||
Steam | J70 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8226 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J66 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8378 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8608 | Snapshot | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8611 | Snapshot | LOW | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8616 | Snapshot | COL | Colchester | ||
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8616 | Snapshot | COL | Colchester | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8629 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8636 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 10/01/1948 | 2523 | Transfer out to: | ||||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 17/01/1948 | 2519 | Transfer out to: | ||||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 17/01/1948 | 2617 | Transfer out to: | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | F5 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 24/01/1948 | 7191 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | F5 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 24/01/1948 | 7194 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | F5 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 24/01/1948 | 7195 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | F5 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 24/01/1948 | 7196 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | F4 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 24/01/1948 | 7224 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | F6 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 24/01/1948 | 7230 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 01/02/1948 | 1730 | Transfer in from: | LOW | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 01/02/1948 | 1761 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/02/1948 | 1555 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/02/1948 | 1556 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/02/1948 | 1557 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/02/1948 | 1558 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 07/02/1948 | 1730 | Transfer in from: | COL | Colchester | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 07/02/1948 | 1761 | Transfer in from: | COL | Colchester | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/02/1948 | 5436 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/02/1948 | 5542 | Transfer in from: | KL | Kings Lynn | ||
Steam | F6 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 07/02/1948 | 7232 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 07/02/1948 | 1730 | Transfer out to: | COL | Colchester | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 07/02/1948 | 1761 | Transfer out to: | COL | Colchester | ||
Steam | F6 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 07/02/1948 | 7230 | Transfer out to: | LOW | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | F6 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 21/02/1948 | 7232 | Transfer out to: | LOW | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 28/02/1948 | 5402 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 28/02/1948 | 5440 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J70 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 06/03/1948 | 8221 | Transfer in from: | IPS | Ipswich | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 13/03/1948 | 77425 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 03/04/1948 | 3107 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 03/04/1948 | 3110 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 03/04/1948 | 3187 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 03/04/1948 | 63156 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 04/04/1948 | 1766 | Transfer out to: | SL | South Lynn | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 06/04/1948 | 1757 | Transfer out to: | SL | South Lynn | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 10/04/1948 | 3101 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 10/04/1948 | 3155 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 10/04/1948 | 63150 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 17/04/1948 | 5374 | Transfer out to: | LOW | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 24/04/1948 | 3029 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 24/04/1948 | 63085 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 24/04/1948 | 3101 | Transfer out to: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 08/05/1948 | 77051 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 08/05/1948 | 77440 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 08/05/1948 | 79312 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 08/05/1948 | 3107 | Transfer out to: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 08/05/1948 | 3110 | Transfer out to: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 08/05/1948 | 77425 | Transfer out to: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 15/05/1948 | 3155 | Transfer out to: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 16/05/1948 | 1730 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 16/05/1948 | 1761 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | F5 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 22/05/1948 | 7204 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | F4 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 22/05/1948 | 7216 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | F4 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 22/05/1948 | 7217 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 22/05/1948 | 8548 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 22/05/1948 | 2565 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/05/1948 | 5385 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/05/1948 | 5436 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/05/1948 | 5542 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | F4 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 22/05/1948 | 7224 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J70 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 22/05/1948 | 8221 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 22/05/1948 | 8629 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 19/06/1948 | 8629 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | F5 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 19/06/1948 | 7213 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 24/07/1948 | 63110 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 14/08/1948 | 8630 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 14/08/1948 | 8631 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J66 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 14/08/1948 | 8378 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 14/08/1948 | 8548 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 23/10/1948 | 8636 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 27/11/1948 | 8608 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 27/11/1948 | 8630 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | B2 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/04/1949 | 1639 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | B2 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 16/04/1949 | 61644 | Transfer in from: | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 16/04/1949 | 8630 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 16/04/1949 | 8636 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 16/04/1949 | 8608 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 09/1949 | 65357 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 03/09/1949 | 68607 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 03/09/1949 | 8636 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 10/09/1949 | 65431 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 10/09/1949 | 65456 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 11/1949 | 65414 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 19/11/1949 | 65369 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 30/11/1949 | 65369 | Transfer in from: | COL | Colchester | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 30/11/1949 | 65446 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | F5 | 2-4-2T | m/e | 30/11/1949 | 67215 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | m/e | 30/11/1949 | 68578 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | m/e | 30/11/1949 | 61553 | Transfer out to: | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 30/11/1949 | 65369 | Transfer out to: | COL | Colchester | ||
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | m/e | 30/11/1949 | 68616 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | F4 | 2-4-2T | on | 04/12/1949 | 7216 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 10/12/1949 | 65446 | Transfer in from: | COL | Colchester | ||
Steam | F5 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 10/12/1949 | 67215 | Transfer in from: | COL | Colchester | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 10/12/1949 | 68578 | Transfer in from: | COL | Colchester | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 10/12/1949 | 65446 | Transfer out to: | COL | Colchester | ||
Steam | F5 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 10/12/1949 | 67215 | Transfer out to: | COL | Colchester | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 10/12/1949 | 68578 | Transfer out to: | COL | Colchester | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/01/1950 | 65427 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | F5 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 14/01/1950 | 67219 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 04/02/1950 | 68630 | Transfer in from: | COL | Colchester | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 04/02/1950 | 68607 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 04/02/1950 | 68630 | Transfer out to: | COL | Colchester | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 14/05/1950 | 68522 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | 3w/e | 31/05/1950 | 5444 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 3w/e | 31/05/1950 | 62572 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 3w/e | 31/05/1950 | 68522 | Transfer in from: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 3w/e | 31/05/1950 | 69711 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 3w/e | 31/05/1950 | 69726 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 3w/e | 31/05/1950 | 62609 | Transfer out to: | 91M | To London Midland Region | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 3w/e | 31/05/1950 | 68522 | Transfer out to: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 62572 | Transfer in from: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 65441 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 65468 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 69711 | Transfer in from: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 69726 | Transfer in from: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 62572 | Transfer out to: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 69711 | Transfer out to: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 69726 | Transfer out to: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 02/07/1950 | 5454 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 09/07/1950 | 68616 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 16/07/1950 | 69701 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 20/08/1950 | 69711 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 17/09/1950 | 68608 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 23/09/1950 | 68608 | Transfer in from: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 23/09/1950 | 68608 | Transfer out to: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 01/10/1950 | 5444 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 01/10/1950 | 5454 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 01/10/1950 | 65446 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J68 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 08/10/1950 | 68638 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 08/10/1950 | 68629 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J68 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 21/10/1950 | 68638 | Transfer in from: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | J68 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 21/10/1950 | 68638 | Transfer out to: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 28/10/1950 | 65361 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 28/10/1950 | 65440 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/11/1950 | 65470 | Transfer in from: | IPS | Ipswich | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/11/1950 | 65479 | Transfer in from: | LOW | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/11/1950 | 65361 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/11/1950 | 65440 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | on | 25/11/1950 | 65402 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | on | 25/11/1950 | 65427 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 65470 | Transfer in from: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 65479 | Transfer in from: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 62572 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 65470 | Transfer out to: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 65479 | Transfer out to: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 23/12/1950 | 68636 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 23/12/1950 | 68630 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | m/e | 31/12/1950 | 68636 | Transfer in from: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | m/e | 31/12/1950 | 68636 | Transfer out to: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 02/1951 | 65369 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 11/02/1951 | 65476 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/02/1951 | 65476 | Transfer in from: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/02/1951 | 65476 | Transfer out to: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | on | 05/03/1951 | 65431 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | E4 | 2-4-0 | 5w/e | 24/03/1951 | 62791 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 24/03/1951 | 65440 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 5w/e | 24/03/1951 | 69726 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | E4 | 2-4-0 | m/e | 31/03/1951 | 62791 | Transfer in from: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 31/03/1951 | 65440 | Transfer in from: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | E4 | 2-4-0 | m/e | 31/03/1951 | 62791 | Transfer out to: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 31/03/1951 | 65440 | Transfer out to: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 26/05/1951 | 61559 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 26/05/1951 | 61567 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 26/05/1951 | 62598 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 26/05/1951 | 62608 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 23/06/1951 | 61559 | Transfer in from: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 23/06/1951 | 61567 | Transfer in from: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 23/06/1951 | 65444 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 23/06/1951 | 61559 | Transfer out to: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 23/06/1951 | 61567 | Transfer out to: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 23/06/1951 | 65476 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | m/e | 07/1951 | 46468 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | m/e | 07/1951 | 46469 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 61515 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 69717 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 68522 | Transfer out to: | 52F | Blyth (North) | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/07/1951 | 61515 | Transfer in from: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/07/1951 | 69678 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/07/1951 | 69717 | Transfer in from: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/07/1951 | 69720 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/07/1951 | 61515 | Transfer out to: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/07/1951 | 65440 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/07/1951 | 65444 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/07/1951 | 69701 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/07/1951 | 69717 | Transfer out to: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 3w/e | 28/07/1951 | 69678 | Transfer in from: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 3w/e | 28/07/1951 | 69720 | Transfer in from: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 3w/e | 28/07/1951 | 69678 | Transfer out to: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 3w/e | 28/07/1951 | 69720 | Transfer out to: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | on | 03/09/1951 | 61559 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 08/09/1951 | 61580 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J70 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 68225 | Transfer in from: | KL | Kings Lynn | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 22/09/1951 | 61580 | Transfer in from: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | J70 | 0-6-0T | 5w/e | 22/09/1951 | 68225 | Transfer in from: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 22/09/1951 | 61580 | Transfer out to: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | J70 | 0-6-0T | 5w/e | 22/09/1951 | 68225 | Transfer out to: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 29/09/1951 | 69678 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 29/09/1951 | 69717 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 20/10/1951 | 90029 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 20/10/1951 | 90085 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 20/10/1951 | 90304 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 20/10/1951 | 90431 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 20/10/1951 | 90471 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 20/10/1951 | 90477 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 20/10/1951 | 90508 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 20/10/1951 | 90522 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 20/10/1951 | 90732 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | on | 12/11/1951 | 61515 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 17/11/1951 | 69672 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 17/11/1951 | 69678 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 17/11/1951 | 69717 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 17/11/1951 | 61567 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | F5 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 17/11/1951 | 67188 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | F5 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 17/11/1951 | 67204 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | F5 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 17/11/1951 | 67215 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 24/11/1951 | 61579 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 24/11/1951 | 61580 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J70 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 68225 | Transfer out to: | 31C | Kings Lynn | ||
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 19/01/1952 | 68608 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 19/01/1952 | 68616 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | F5 | 2-4-2T | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 67195 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | F5 | 2-4-2T | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 67219 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 69716 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 69719 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 19/07/1952 | 69716 | Transfer in from: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 19/07/1952 | 69719 | Transfer in from: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 19/07/1952 | 69716 | Transfer out to: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 19/07/1952 | 69719 | Transfer out to: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | F5 | 2-4-2T | 4w/e | 20/09/1952 | 67217 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | F5 | 2-4-2T | 4w/e | 20/09/1952 | 67190 | Transfer out to: | 32C | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 20/09/1952 | 69678 | Transfer out to: | 34C | Hatfield | ||
Steam | F5 | 2-4-2T | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 67217 | Transfer in from: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | N2 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 69550 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | N2 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 69555 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | N2 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 69558 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | F5 | 2-4-2T | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 67217 | Transfer out to: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 69672 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 69716 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 69717 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 69719 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | N2 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 18/10/1952 | 69550 | Transfer in from: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | N2 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 18/10/1952 | 69555 | Transfer in from: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | N2 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 18/10/1952 | 69558 | Transfer in from: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | N2 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 18/10/1952 | 69550 | Transfer out to: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | N2 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 18/10/1952 | 69555 | Transfer out to: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | N2 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 18/10/1952 | 69558 | Transfer out to: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 69672 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 69719 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 65443 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 15/11/1952 | 69672 | Transfer in from: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 15/11/1952 | 69719 | Transfer in from: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | E4 | 2-4-0 | 4w/e | 15/11/1952 | 62791 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 15/11/1952 | 69672 | Transfer out to: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 15/11/1952 | 69719 | Transfer out to: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | F5 | 2-4-2T | 4w/e | 14/02/1953 | 67207 | Transfer out to: | 32C | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 5w/e | 21/03/1953 | 69673 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | N2 | 0-6-2T | 5w/e | 21/03/1953 | 69550 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | F5 | 2-4-2T | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 67188 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | F5 | 2-4-2T | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 67194 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/07/1953 | 65466 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J70 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 25/07/1953 | 68222 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/07/1953 | 65479 | Transfer out to: | 34D | Hitchin (GNR) | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 21/11/1953 | 68508 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/11/1953 | 69732 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | F5 | 2-4-2T | 4w/e | 21/11/1953 | 67188 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J70 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 21/11/1953 | 68222 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/11/1953 | 69719 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/12/1953 | 61634 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/12/1953 | 61645 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/12/1953 | 61646 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/12/1953 | 61650 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/12/1953 | 61651 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/12/1953 | 61662 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/12/1953 | 61667 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/12/1953 | 61512 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/12/1953 | 61523 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/12/1953 | 61555 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/12/1953 | 61556 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/12/1953 | 61557 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/12/1953 | 61558 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/12/1953 | 61579 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/05/1954 | 61666 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/05/1954 | 61634 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 19/02/1955 | 68561 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 19/02/1955 | 68578 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 19/02/1955 | 68636 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 19/02/1955 | 69720 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | F5 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 07/03/1955 | 67196 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | on | 28/03/1955 | 65384 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | F5 | 2-4-2T | 5w/e | 23/04/1955 | 67194 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 5w/e | 23/04/1955 | 68601 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 02/05/1955 | 65543 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 3w/e | 14/05/1955 | 61658 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 3w/e | 14/05/1955 | 69720 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 3w/e | 14/05/1955 | 61645 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 23/07/1955 | 61654 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 23/07/1955 | 61668 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 23/07/1955 | 61672 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | J70 | 0-6-0T | on | 02/08/1955 | 68226 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 22/10/1955 | 61654 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 22/10/1955 | 61668 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 22/10/1955 | 61672 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | F5 | 2-4-2T | on | 21/11/1955 | 67191 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | F5 | 2-4-2T | on | 21/11/1955 | 67217 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | F5 | 2-4-2T | 5w/e | 17/12/1955 | 67188 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | F5 | 2-4-2T | 5w/e | 17/12/1955 | 67192 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | F6 | 2-4-2T | 5w/e | 17/12/1955 | 67225 | Transfer in from: | MC | Melton Constable | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 5w/e | 17/12/1955 | 69619 | Transfer in from: | PKS | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | N2 | 0-6-2T | 5w/e | 17/12/1955 | 69555 | Transfer out to: | 34B | Hornsey | ||
Steam | F5 | 2-4-2T | on | 29/12/1955 | 67188 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N2 | 0-6-2T | 5w/e | 21/01/1956 | 69555 | Transfer in from: | 34B | Hornsey | ||
Steam | 79 | 4-4-2T | 4w/e | 18/02/1956 | 41949 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J68 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 18/02/1956 | 68662 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J68 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 18/02/1956 | 68666 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 18/02/1956 | 68508 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J68 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 18/02/1956 | 68638 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | F6 | 2-4-2T | 5w/e | 24/03/1956 | 67228 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 5w/e | 24/03/1956 | 68552 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | F5 | 2-4-2T | 5w/e | 24/03/1956 | 67194 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 5w/e | 24/03/1956 | 68601 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 5w/e | 24/03/1956 | 69619 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 5w/e | 24/03/1956 | 69672 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | 79 | 4-4-2T | 4w/e | 25/05/1956 | 41936 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | F6 | 2-4-2T | on | 28/05/1956 | 67225 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | F6 | 2-4-2T | 3w/e | 16/06/1956 | 67227 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | m/e | 21/07/1956 | 61645 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | m/e | 21/07/1956 | 61648 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | m/e | 21/07/1956 | 61660 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | N2 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 25/08/1956 | 69558 | Transfer out to: | 34A | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | 79 | 4-4-2T | 4w/e | 22/09/1956 | 41975 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/09/1956 | 61645 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/09/1956 | 61646 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/09/1956 | 61648 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/09/1956 | 61660 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 22/09/1956 | 68561 | Transfer out to: | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 22/09/1956 | 69720 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | N2 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 20/10/1956 | 69555 | Transfer out to: | 34A | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 30/10/1956 | 61336 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/11/1956 | 61555 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/11/1956 | 61556 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/11/1956 | 61557 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/11/1956 | 61558 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/11/1956 | 61606 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/11/1956 | 61608 | Transfer in from: | CAM | Cambridge | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/11/1956 | 61611 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | B2 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/11/1956 | 61607 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | B2 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/11/1956 | 61614 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | B2 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/11/1956 | 61615 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | B2 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/11/1956 | 61616 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | B2 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/11/1956 | 61632 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | B2 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/11/1956 | 61639 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | B2 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/11/1956 | 61644 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | B2 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 15/12/1956 | 61603 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | F5 | 2-4-2T | on | 20/12/1956 | 67189 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1957 | 61557 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 06/01/1957 | 61000 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 06/01/1957 | 61089 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 06/01/1957 | 61360 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 06/01/1957 | 61361 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 06/01/1957 | 61363 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 06/01/1957 | 61370 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 06/01/1957 | 61373 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 19/01/1957 | 61555 | Transfer out to: | 35B | Grantham | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 19/01/1957 | 61556 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 19/01/1957 | 61558 | Transfer out to: | 35C | Spital Bridge | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 19/01/1957 | 61606 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 19/01/1957 | 61608 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 19/01/1957 | 61611 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 16/02/1957 | 69721 | Transfer in from: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 16/02/1957 | 69727 | Transfer in from: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 16/02/1957 | 69733 | Transfer in from: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | 79 | 4-4-2T | 4w/e | 15/06/1957 | 41936 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | 79 | 4-4-2T | 4w/e | 15/06/1957 | 41949 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | 79 | 4-4-2T | 4w/e | 15/06/1957 | 41975 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 69612 | Transfer in from: | 34B | Hornsey | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 69709 | Transfer in from: | 34C | Hatfield | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 29/09/1957 | 61089 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 19/10/1957 | 69613 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/10/1957 | 61667 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 19/10/1957 | 69709 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 19/10/1957 | 69721 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | F6 | 2-4-2T | 4w/e | 08/01/1958 | 67228 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | on | 10/03/1958 | 65432 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | F5 | 2-4-2T | on | 21/04/1958 | 67192 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | F6 | 2-4-2T | on | 08/05/1958 | 67227 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 61606 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 61608 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 61612 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 61613 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 61661 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 68573 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 68579 | Transfer in from: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Steam | J68 | 0-6-0T | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 68662 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J68 | 0-6-0T | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 68666 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | on | 28/07/1958 | 65466 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | on | 28/07/1958 | 68631 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/08/1958 | 61612 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/09/1958 | 61606 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | on | 03/09/1958 | 61650 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 13/09/1958 | 65472 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | on | 29/09/1958 | 65522 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | on | 08/10/1958 | 65441 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/10/1958 | 65443 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/10/1958 | 61613 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/10/1958 | 61661 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 14/12/1958 | 61300 | Transfer in from: | CAM | Cambridge | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 14/12/1958 | 61311 | Transfer in from: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 20/12/1958 | 61663 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 20/12/1958 | 61668 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 20/12/1958 | 65446 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 20/12/1958 | 65503 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 20/12/1958 | 65505 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 20/12/1958 | 65506 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 20/12/1958 | 65507 | Transfer in from: | 32C | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 20/12/1958 | 65511 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 20/12/1958 | 65514 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 20/12/1958 | 65545 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 20/12/1958 | 69617 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 20/12/1958 | 69652 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 20/12/1958 | 61608 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 20/12/1958 | 61658 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 31/01/1959 | 69686 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 14/02/1959 | 61658 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 14/02/1959 | 61651 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 07/03/1959 | 43152 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 07/03/1959 | 43153 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 12/04/1959 | 61360 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | on | 21/04/1959 | 65531 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 09/05/1959 | 69686 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 16/05/1959 | 69727 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 14/06/1959 | 61370 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 03/08/1959 | 69612 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/09/1959 | 65468 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 25/10/1959 | 61373 | Transfer out to: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | on | 26/10/1959 | 65545 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/11/1959 | 61000 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/11/1959 | 61311 | Transfer out to: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | on | 06/11/1959 | 65505 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 46468 | Transfer out to: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 46469 | Transfer out to: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 61658 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 61662 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 61666 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 65445 | Transfer out to: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 65507 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 65514 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J16 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 65539 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 68552 | Transfer out to: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 68573 | Transfer out to: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 68579 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 69613 | Transfer out to: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 69673 | Transfer out to: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 69732 | Transfer out to: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 69733 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 05/12/1959 | 61663 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 05/12/1959 | 61668 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 05/12/1959 | 65472 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 06/12/1959 | 61300 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 06/12/1959 | 61336 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 06/12/1959 | 61361 | Transfer out to: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 06/12/1959 | 61363 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | on | 07/12/1959 | 65443 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | on | 07/12/1959 | 65470 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 12/12/1959 | 43152 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 12/12/1959 | 43153 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 12/12/1959 | 65424 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 12/12/1959 | 65446 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 12/12/1959 | 65448 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 12/12/1959 | 65465 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 12/12/1959 | 65473 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 12/12/1959 | 65503 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 12/12/1959 | 65506 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 12/12/1959 | 65511 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 12/12/1959 | 65564 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 12/12/1959 | 69617 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 12/12/1959 | 69652 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1967 | D3494 | Transfer in from: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1967 | D3496 | Transfer in from: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/01/1967 | D2277 | Transfer in from: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/01/1967 | D2279 | Transfer in from: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/01/1967 | D2280 | Transfer in from: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/01/1967 | D2572 | Transfer in from: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/01/1967 | D3298 | Transfer in from: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/01/1967 | D3299 | Transfer in from: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/01/1967 | D3441 | Transfer in from: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/01/1967 | D3680 | Transfer in from: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/01/1967 | D3684 | Transfer in from: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/01/1967 | D4186 | Transfer in from: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | on | 19/02/1967 | D2572 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 21/10/1967 | D3692 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 21/10/1967 | D3693 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 28/10/1967 | D2277 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 28/10/1967 | D2279 | Transfer out to: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 28/10/1967 | D2280 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | on | 26/11/1967 | D3496 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 09/12/1967 | D3331 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 11/05/1968 | D2241 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 11/05/1968 | D2277 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 11/05/1968 | D2278 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 11/05/1968 | D2281 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 11/05/1968 | D2282 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 11/05/1968 | D2283 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 11/05/1968 | D2284 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 11/05/1968 | D2285 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 11/05/1968 | D2296 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 11/05/1968 | D3326 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | on | 26/05/1968 | D3494 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 08/06/1968 | D3307 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 31/08/1968 | D3134 | Transfer in from: | 65F | Grangemouth | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/09/1968 | D3441 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 28/09/1968 | D3918 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 28/09/1968 | D3680 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | on | 20/10/1968 | D2281 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 26/10/1968 | D2280 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | on | 31/05/1969 | D2277 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 13/09/1969 | D2249 | Transfer in from: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 13/09/1969 | D2279 | Transfer in from: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/09/1969 | D2285 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1969 | D2297 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | on | 31/12/1969 | D2283 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | on | 31/12/1969 | D2296 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 04/04/1970 | D2158 | Transfer in from: | 55F | Bradford Hammerton Street | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | on | 19/04/1970 | D2278 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 25/04/1970 | D2223 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 20/06/1970 | D3134 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 27/06/1970 | D3299 | Transfer out to: | 36C | Frodingham | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | on | 02/07/1970 | D2297 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 01/08/1970 | D2135 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 08/08/1970 | D2158 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | on | 27/12/1970 | D2249 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | on | 27/12/1970 | D2282 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 02/01/1971 | D2027 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 02/01/1971 | D2088 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/01/1971 | D3693 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 13/03/1971 | D2051 | Transfer in from: | 55F | Bradford Hammerton Street | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | on | 14/03/1971 | D2280 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 20/03/1971 | D2060 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | on | 11/04/1971 | D2284 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 08/05/1971 | D2092 | Transfer in from: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 08/05/1971 | D2160 | Transfer in from: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 08/05/1971 | D2161 | Transfer in from: | 55G | Knottingley | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | on | 23/05/1971 | D2223 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | on | 23/05/1971 | D2241 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | on | 23/05/1971 | D2279 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 05/02/1972 | D3882 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | on | 08/06/1972 | D2088 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 10/06/1972 | D2109 | Transfer in from: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 17/06/1972 | D3935 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 17/06/1972 | D3684 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 25/11/1972 | D2009 | Transfer in from: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | on | 14/12/1972 | D2051 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 11/01/1975 | 08745 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 31/05/1975 | 08745 | Transfer out to: | DR | Doncaster | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | on | 13/07/1975 | 03109 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 13/09/1975 | 03180 | Transfer in from: | SF | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 11/10/1975 | 03179 | Transfer in from: | 70F | Bournemouth | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 11/10/1975 | 03196 | Transfer in from: | 70F | Bournemouth | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | on | 31/01/1976 | 03027 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | on | 31/01/1976 | 03135 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 21/02/1976 | 03161 | Transfer out to: | SF | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 11/07/1976 | 03158 | Transfer in from: | 50C | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | on | 11/07/1976 | 03009 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 01/1977 | 03162 | Transfer in from: | 55F | Bradford Hammerton Street | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 01/1977 | 03060 | Transfer out to: | HS | Bradford Hammerton Street | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 02/1977 | 03399 | Transfer in from: | 16C | Derby | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 04/1977 | 08460 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 04/1977 | 03092 | Transfer out to: | SF | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/04/1978 | 08661 | Transfer in from: | SF | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 09/1981 | 03180 | Transfer out to: | NR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 11/1981 | 08228 | Transfer in from: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 11/1981 | 08228 | Transfer out to: | CR | Colchester | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | on | 08/11/1981 | 03196 | Transfer out to: | BC | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | on | 13/12/1981 | 03160 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 04/12/1983 | 08261 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 19/02/1984 | 08256 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 07/10/1984 | 08237 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 07/04/1985 | 08228 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | on | 05/07/1987 | 03158 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | on | 05/07/1987 | 03399 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | on | 23/05/1989 | 03162 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 31/01/1994 | 08767 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | on | 31/07/2002 | 03179 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 31/01/2003 | 08661 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/09/2008 | 08715 | Condemned |