Depot: Colwick
Type | Class | Wheels | Period | Date | Number | Event | Code | Depot | Length of Stay | Notes |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | Q1 | 0-8-0 | m/e | 02/1901 | 401 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Q1 | 0-8-0 | m/e | 03/1902 | 402 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Q1 | 0-8-0 | m/e | 06/1902 | 409 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Q1 | 0-8-0 | m/e | 07/1902 | 408 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Q1 | 0-8-0 | m/e | 07/1902 | 410 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Q1 | 0-8-0 | m/e | 07/1902 | 411 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Q1 | 0-8-0 | m/e | 08/1902 | 412 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Q1 | 0-8-0 | m/e | 09/1902 | 414 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Q1 | 0-8-0 | m/e | 10/1902 | 415 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Q1 | 0-8-0 | m/e | 12/1902 | 416 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Q1 | 0-8-0 | m/e | 01/1903 | 417 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Q1 | 0-8-0 | m/e | 01/1903 | 418 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Q1 | 0-8-0 | m/e | 01/1903 | 421 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Q1 | 0-8-0 | m/e | 09/1903 | 425 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Q1 | 0-8-0 | m/e | 03/1904 | 433 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Q1 | 0-8-0 | m/e | 03/1904 | 436 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Q1 | 0-8-0 | m/e | 04/1904 | 437 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Q1 | 0-8-0 | m/e | 08/1904 | 439 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Q1 | 0-8-0 | m/e | 12/1906 | 443 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Q1 | 0-8-0 | m/e | 07/1909 | 448 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Q1 | 0-8-0 | m/e | 08/1909 | 449 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Q1 | 0-8-0 | m/e | 08/1909 | 450 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | m/e | 08/1912 | 1630 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | m/e | 02/1913 | 1631 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | m/e | 02/1913 | 1633 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | m/e | 03/1913 | 1635 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | m/e | 04/1913 | 1638 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | m/e | 04/1913 | 1639 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | O3 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 05/1919 | 464 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | O3 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 06/1919 | 469 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | O3 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 06/1919 | 470 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | O3 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 06/1919 | 471 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | m/e | 1923 | 1646 | Transfer in from: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | m/e | 1923 | 1690 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | m/e | 09/1923 | 1639 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 31/03/1924 | 383 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 05/04/1924 | 380 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 05/04/1924 | 381 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 05/04/1924 | 382 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 05/04/1924 | 385 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 05/04/1924 | 387 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 05/04/1924 | 6313 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 05/04/1924 | 6314 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 05/04/1924 | 6321 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | m/e | 05/1924 | 1631 | Transfer out to: | CAM | Cambridge | ||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | m/e | 05/1924 | 1633 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | m/e | 05/1924 | 4630 | Transfer out to: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 13/12/1924 | 6322 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 21/01/1925 | 6324 | Transfer in from: | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 24/01/1925 | 6361 | Transfer in from: | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | ||
Steam | O3 | 2-8-0 | on | 13/03/1925 | 469 | Transfer out to: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 14/03/1925 | 6363 | Transfer in from: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 16/03/1925 | 6270 | Transfer in from: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 16/03/1925 | 6279 | Transfer in from: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 16/03/1925 | 6308 | Transfer in from: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | O3 | 2-8-0 | on | 16/03/1925 | 3471 | Transfer out to: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | O3 | 2-8-0 | on | 17/03/1925 | 3464 | Transfer out to: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | O3 | 2-8-0 | on | 17/03/1925 | 3470 | Transfer out to: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/03/1925 | 6266 | Transfer in from: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 13/06/1925 | 4652 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 20/06/1925 | 4646 | Transfer out to: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | on | 22/06/1925 | 4634 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | on | 01/07/1925 | 4633 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | B13 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/07/1925 | 746 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 01/07/1925 | 4652 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 03/07/1925 | 6266 | Transfer out to: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | on | 22/07/1925 | 4637 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | on | 29/07/1925 | 4635 | Transfer out to: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | on | 30/07/1925 | 4630 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 05/08/1925 | 1690 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | on | 07/08/1925 | 4636 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | on | 15/08/1925 | 1639 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 15/08/1925 | 6510 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/08/1925 | 6539 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/08/1925 | 6540 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-8-0 | on | 22/09/1925 | 3439 | Transfer out to: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 28/10/1925 | 5037 | Transfer in from: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | O3 | 2-8-0 | on | 27/11/1925 | 3459 | Transfer in from: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | O3 | 2-8-0 | on | 27/11/1925 | 3469 | Transfer in from: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | O3 | 2-8-0 | on | 27/11/1925 | 3475 | Transfer in from: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 27/11/1925 | 6313 | Transfer out to: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 27/11/1925 | 6314 | Transfer out to: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 27/11/1925 | 6321 | Transfer out to: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | O3 | 2-8-0 | on | 28/11/1925 | 3468 | Transfer in from: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 30/11/1925 | 5034 | Transfer in from: | LEI | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 06/12/1925 | 4650 | Transfer in from: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 08/01/1926 | 6497 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 09/01/1926 | 6525 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 09/01/1926 | 6528 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 03/02/1926 | 6296 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 03/02/1926 | 6338 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 04/02/1926 | 6521 | Transfer in from: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 09/02/1926 | 5458 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 02/03/1926 | 6530 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 04/03/1926 | 5036 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 05/03/1926 | 6522 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 06/03/1926 | 6519 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B8 | 4-6-0 | on | 27/03/1926 | 5441 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B8 | 4-6-0 | on | 27/03/1926 | 5443 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 27/03/1926 | 5034 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B8 | 4-6-0 | on | 29/03/1926 | 5439 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B8 | 4-6-0 | on | 29/03/1926 | 5446 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B8 | 4-6-0 | on | 31/03/1926 | 5279 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/04/1926 | 5036 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/04/1926 | 5458 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 07/04/1926 | 5037 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | on | 17/04/1926 | 4632 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 24/04/1926 | 6519 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 25/04/1926 | 4650 | Transfer out to: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | B8 | 4-6-0 | on | 06/06/1926 | 5446 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | B13 | 4-6-0 | on | 07/06/1926 | 757 | Transfer in from: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | B8 | 4-6-0 | on | 09/06/1926 | 5004 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B8 | 4-6-0 | on | 10/06/1926 | 5280 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B8 | 4-6-0 | on | 09/07/1926 | 5442 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B13 | 4-6-0 | on | 22/09/1926 | 757 | Transfer out to: | YK | York (North) | ||
Steam | B8 | 4-6-0 | on | 08/11/1926 | 5004 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | B8 | 4-6-0 | on | 08/11/1926 | 5279 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 21/01/1927 | 5213 | Transfer in from: | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 26/01/1927 | 6140 | Transfer in from: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 02/1927 | 6211 | Transfer in from: | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 21/02/1927 | 6366 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 04/03/1927 | 6312 | Transfer in from: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 14/03/1927 | 6312 | Transfer out to: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | B8 | 4-6-0 | on | 31/03/1927 | 5280 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 05/04/1927 | 5213 | Transfer out to: | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 05/04/1927 | 6366 | Transfer out to: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | on | 11/06/1927 | 4630 | Transfer out to: | CAM | Cambridge | ||
Steam | B8 | 4-6-0 | on | 16/06/1927 | 5444 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 22/08/1927 | 4640 | Transfer in from: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | on | 23/08/1927 | 4634 | Transfer out to: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-8-0 | on | 02/09/1927 | 3408 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 06/09/1927 | 5381 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-8-0 | on | 13/09/1927 | 3402 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 16/09/1927 | 6296 | Transfer out to: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 16/09/1927 | 6539 | Transfer out to: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 30/09/1927 | 6598 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | B8 | 4-6-0 | on | 12/10/1927 | 5440 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B8 | 4-6-0 | on | 12/10/1927 | 5444 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 14/10/1927 | 5380 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 26/10/1927 | 5394 | Transfer in from: | KEA | Keadby | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 31/10/1927 | 6598 | Transfer out to: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 01/11/1927 | 6249 | Transfer in from: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 03/11/1927 | 5394 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 21/11/1927 | 6249 | Transfer out to: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 31/12/1927 | 6586 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Q1 | 0-8-0 | on | 01/03/1928 | 3437 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B8 | 4-6-0 | on | 06/03/1928 | 5279 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 15/03/1928 | 6601 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | B8 | 4-6-0 | on | 02/04/1928 | 5280 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | B8 | 4-6-0 | on | 02/04/1928 | 5444 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 24/04/1928 | 6573 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | B8 | 4-6-0 | on | 08/06/1928 | 5280 | Transfer out to: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-8-0 | on | 27/06/1928 | 3425 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Q1 | 0-8-0 | on | 23/07/1928 | 3412 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 16/08/1928 | 2079 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | B8 | 4-6-0 | on | 15/10/1928 | 5442 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | B8 | 4-6-0 | on | 14/11/1928 | 5445 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | m/e | 01/1929 | 4643 | Transfer in from: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-8-0 | on | 02/01/1929 | 3443 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 05/02/1929 | 6344 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-8-0 | on | 16/02/1929 | 3432 | Transfer in from: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-8-0 | on | 09/03/1929 | 3426 | Transfer in from: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 30/04/1929 | 1914 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 03/05/1929 | 1609 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | on | 11/05/1929 | 4637 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-8-0 | on | 18/05/1929 | 3415 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 08/06/1929 | 4646 | Transfer in from: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-8-0 | on | 20/06/1929 | 3401 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O3 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/07/1929 | 3468 | Transfer out to: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 11/09/1929 | 6140 | Transfer out to: | KEA | Keadby | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 08/11/1929 | 2780 | Transfer in from: | YK | York (North) | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 15/11/1929 | 2781 | Transfer in from: | YK | York (North) | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 15/11/1929 | 2780 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 19/11/1929 | 2781 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-8-0 | on | 30/11/1929 | 3418 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Q1 | 0-8-0 | on | 31/12/1929 | 3414 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Q1 | 0-8-0 | on | 08/02/1930 | 3433 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Q1 | 0-8-0 | on | 08/02/1930 | 3436 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 05/06/1930 | 6339 | Transfer in from: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/06/1930 | 6344 | Transfer out to: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/06/1930 | 6525 | Transfer out to: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 25/06/1930 | 6339 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | on | 29/07/1930 | 4636 | Transfer out to: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 31/07/1930 | 4654 | Transfer in from: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 04/08/1930 | 4641 | Transfer in from: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | on | 04/08/1930 | 4639 | Transfer out to: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 12/08/1930 | 4651 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | on | 13/08/1930 | 4632 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 25/08/1930 | 4659 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-8-0 | on | 27/08/1930 | 3449 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 20/09/1930 | 2704 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 25/09/1930 | 4654 | Transfer out to: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 03/10/1930 | 2704 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-8-0 | on | 08/12/1930 | 3411 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 19/12/1930 | 6336 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1931 | 6052 | Transfer in from: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 02/01/1931 | 5067 | Transfer in from: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 02/01/1931 | 6192 | Transfer in from: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 09/01/1931 | 5067 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 09/01/1931 | 6052 | Transfer out to: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | on | 14/01/1931 | 4633 | Transfer out to: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/04/1931 | 6356 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 14/05/1931 | 6634 | Transfer in from: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 15/05/1931 | 6356 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/05/1931 | 6634 | Transfer out to: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-8-0 | on | 05/08/1931 | 3409 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Q1 | 0-8-0 | on | 09/09/1931 | 3426 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Q1 | 0-8-0 | on | 27/10/1931 | 3432 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B13 | 4-6-0 | on | 28/11/1931 | 746 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Q1 | 0-8-0 | on | 12/02/1932 | 3448 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 15/03/1932 | 2976 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 27/07/1932 | 4659 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 09/08/1932 | 6587 | Transfer in from: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-8-0 | on | 10/08/1932 | 3410 | Transfer out to: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 29/08/1932 | 6565 | Transfer in from: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 19/10/1932 | 6541 | Transfer in from: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | B8 | 4-6-0 | on | 04/01/1933 | 5440 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 21/05/1933 | 4659 | Transfer in from: | COP | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/05/1933 | 1295 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 31/05/1933 | 1296 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-8-0 | on | 15/06/1933 | 3450 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 06/10/1933 | 4659 | Transfer out to: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | B8 | 4-6-0 | on | 09/10/1933 | 5279 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 27/10/1933 | 5407 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | on | 01/11/1933 | 4638 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 02/11/1933 | 4659 | Transfer in from: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 04/11/1933 | 2694 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 04/11/1933 | 2779 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 08/11/1933 | 6505 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 11/11/1933 | 6311 | Transfer in from: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 14/11/1933 | 6619 | Transfer in from: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 24/11/1933 | 5001 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 02/12/1933 | 2694 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 02/12/1933 | 2779 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 16/12/1933 | 6202 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 16/12/1933 | 6262 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 16/12/1933 | 6354 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 29/12/1933 | 5400 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 1934 | 6262 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 03/01/1934 | 5398 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 11/01/1934 | 6251 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/01/1934 | 6532 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 05/02/1934 | 6207 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 10/02/1934 | 6354 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 15/02/1934 | 6368 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 15/02/1934 | 6202 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 16/02/1934 | 6218 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 20/02/1934 | 6138 | Transfer in from: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/02/1934 | 5407 | Transfer out to: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 21/02/1934 | 6132 | Transfer in from: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 21/02/1934 | 5398 | Transfer out to: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 21/02/1934 | 5400 | Transfer out to: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 23/02/1934 | 6137 | Transfer in from: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 28/03/1934 | 1296 | Transfer out to: | TFD | Trafford Park (LNER) | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 10/04/1934 | 1295 | Transfer out to: | TFD | Trafford Park (LNER) | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-8-0 | on | 19/05/1934 | 3421 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O3 | 2-8-0 | on | 09/08/1934 | 3469 | Transfer out to: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | O3 | 2-8-0 | on | 09/08/1934 | 3475 | Transfer out to: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | O3 | 2-8-0 | on | 08/10/1934 | 3475 | Transfer in from: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | O3 | 2-8-0 | on | 09/10/1934 | 3469 | Transfer in from: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | O3 | 2-8-0 | on | 08/11/1934 | 3469 | Transfer out to: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | O3 | 2-8-0 | on | 08/11/1934 | 3475 | Transfer out to: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 05/12/1934 | 6138 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1935 | 4660 | Transfer in from: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1935 | 4661 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 22/02/1935 | 6532 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 25/02/1935 | 6246 | Transfer in from: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 25/02/1935 | 6522 | Transfer out to: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 21/03/1935 | 6225 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 04/07/1935 | 4661 | Transfer out to: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 05/07/1935 | 4660 | Transfer out to: | BOS | Boston | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 15/07/1935 | 6264 | Transfer in from: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | O3 | 2-8-0 | on | 19/08/1935 | 3459 | Transfer out to: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 09/09/1935 | 4666 | Transfer in from: | BOS | Boston | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 10/09/1935 | 2951 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 10/09/1935 | 4660 | Transfer in from: | BOS | Boston | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 10/09/1935 | 6606 | Transfer in from: | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 25/09/1935 | 1281 | Transfer in from: | LIN | Lincoln | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 04/10/1935 | 2951 | Transfer out to: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 07/10/1935 | 6132 | Transfer out to: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 14/10/1935 | 5405 | Transfer in from: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 24/10/1935 | 6377 | Transfer in from: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | D3 | 4-4-0 | m/e | 11/1935 | 4073 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | J3 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 11/1935 | 4109 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | D3 | 4-4-0 | m/e | 11/1935 | 4312 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | D3 | 4-4-0 | m/e | 11/1935 | 4346 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 11/1935 | 6509 | Transfer in from: | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 11/1935 | 6635 | Transfer in from: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 02/11/1935 | 6137 | Transfer out to: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 15/11/1935 | 5008 | Transfer in from: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 29/11/1935 | 6509 | Transfer out to: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 12/1935 | 6635 | Transfer out to: | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-8-0 | on | 17/12/1935 | 3416 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Q1 | 0-8-0 | on | 17/12/1935 | 3417 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/12/1935 | 6509 | Transfer in from: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/12/1935 | 6635 | Transfer in from: | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 28/12/1935 | 6635 | Transfer out to: | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | J3 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 01/1936 | 3332 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | J3 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 01/1936 | 4092 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | m/e | 01/1936 | 4516 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 01/1936 | 5399 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | m/e | 01/1936 | 5546 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 01/1936 | 6295 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | m/e | 01/1936 | 4666 | Transfer out to: | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 30/01/1936 | 5399 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 30/01/1936 | 6295 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 30/01/1936 | 5399 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 30/01/1936 | 6295 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 12/02/1936 | 2785 | Transfer in from: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 29/02/1936 | 2696 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 05/03/1936 | 1495 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 06/03/1936 | 4646 | Transfer out to: | CAM | Cambridge | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 19/03/1936 | 4640 | Transfer out to: | CAM | Cambridge | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 11/04/1936 | 1495 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 28/04/1936 | 2971 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 18/06/1936 | 4659 | Transfer out to: | BOS | Boston | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 28/07/1936 | 4651 | Transfer out to: | BOS | Boston | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 01/09/1936 | 4651 | Transfer in from: | BOS | Boston | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 07/09/1936 | 4680 | Transfer in from: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 06/10/1936 | 4646 | Transfer in from: | CAM | Cambridge | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 23/10/1936 | 1828 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 24/10/1936 | 1856 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 26/10/1936 | 4683 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 07/11/1936 | 4640 | Transfer in from: | CAM | Cambridge | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 12/11/1936 | 1857 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 14/11/1936 | 1854 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 04/01/1937 | 6249 | Transfer in from: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 04/01/1937 | 6257 | Transfer in from: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 04/01/1937 | 6207 | Transfer out to: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 04/01/1937 | 6505 | Transfer out to: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 08/02/1937 | 1281 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 04/03/1937 | 5470 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 14/03/1937 | 6225 | Transfer out to: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 16/03/1937 | 5034 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 03/06/1937 | 4640 | Transfer out to: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 04/06/1937 | 2970 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | m/e | 11/1937 | 4516 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 13/12/1937 | 5034 | Transfer out to: | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 05/01/1938 | 5470 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 25/04/1938 | 1898 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 29/04/1938 | 1903 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 05/05/1938 | 2971 | Transfer out to: | LEI | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 05/07/1938 | 3282 | Transfer in from: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 13/07/1938 | 3278 | Transfer in from: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/11/1938 | 6353 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/11/1938 | 6354 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 19/12/1938 | 1273 | Transfer in from: | LIN | Lincoln | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 30/12/1938 | 5001 | Transfer out to: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 04/01/1939 | 4402 | Transfer in from: | CAM | Cambridge | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 11/03/1939 | 6192 | Transfer out to: | BRN | Barnsley | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 31/07/1939 | 5449 | Transfer in from: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 03/08/1939 | 2987 | Transfer in from: | BOS | Boston | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 17/08/1939 | 5165 | Transfer in from: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 29/02/1940 | 4646 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 29/02/1940 | 4651 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | B18 | 4-6-0 | on | 03/03/1940 | 5195 | Transfer in from: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | B18 | 4-6-0 | on | 03/03/1940 | 5196 | Transfer in from: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/04/1940 | 6509 | Transfer out to: | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 25/05/1940 | 5007 | Transfer in from: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 25/05/1940 | 5373 | Transfer in from: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | B18 | 4-6-0 | on | 26/05/1940 | 5196 | Transfer out to: | LEI | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 27/06/1940 | 5007 | Transfer out to: | NEA | Neasden | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 14/07/1940 | 2987 | Transfer out to: | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 22/08/1940 | 2970 | Transfer out to: | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 06/09/1940 | 2970 | Transfer in from: | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 14/09/1940 | 2971 | Transfer in from: | LEI | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 16/09/1940 | 6324 | Transfer out to: | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 16/09/1940 | 6377 | Transfer out to: | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 13/10/1940 | 6214 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 13/10/1940 | 6575 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 13/10/1940 | 6626 | Transfer in from: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 23/10/1940 | 2987 | Transfer in from: | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 07/11/1940 | 5373 | Transfer out to: | NEA | Neasden | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 08/11/1940 | 5165 | Transfer out to: | NEA | Neasden | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 22/11/1940 | 6295 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 22/11/1940 | 6586 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 22/11/1940 | 6295 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 22/11/1940 | 6586 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/11/1940 | 6540 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/11/1940 | 6540 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 24/11/1940 | 6336 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 24/11/1940 | 6336 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 28/11/1940 | 6573 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 28/11/1940 | 6573 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 01/12/1940 | 6619 | Transfer out to: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 09/09/1941 | 3098 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 09/09/1941 | 5449 | Transfer out to: | NEA | Neasden | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 09/09/1941 | 709 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 10/09/1941 | 711 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 10/09/1941 | 713 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 13/09/1941 | 703 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 13/09/1941 | 706 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 13/09/1941 | 715 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 13/09/1941 | 727 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 14/09/1941 | 718 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 14/09/1941 | 728 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 19/09/1941 | 751 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 19/09/1941 | 752 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 04/10/1941 | 6140 | Transfer in from: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 04/10/1941 | 782 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 05/10/1941 | 6140 | Transfer out to: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 06/10/1941 | 4408 | Transfer in from: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 08/10/1941 | 3091 | Transfer in from: | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 08/10/1941 | 3093 | Transfer in from: | BOS | Boston | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 08/10/1941 | 3094 | Transfer in from: | BOS | Boston | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 08/10/1941 | 3095 | Transfer in from: | BOS | Boston | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 09/10/1941 | 3089 | Transfer in from: | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 09/10/1941 | 3090 | Transfer in from: | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 11/10/1941 | 3275 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 13/10/1941 | 3089 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 13/10/1941 | 3090 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | H2 | 4-4-4T | on | 04/12/1941 | 6418 | Transfer in from: | NEA | Neasden | ||
Steam | H2 | 4-4-4T | on | 04/12/1941 | 6422 | Transfer in from: | NEA | Neasden | ||
Steam | H2 | 4-4-4T | on | 05/12/1941 | 6416 | Transfer in from: | NEA | Neasden | ||
Steam | H2 | 4-4-4T | on | 05/12/1941 | 6419 | Transfer in from: | NEA | Neasden | ||
Steam | H2 | 4-4-4T | on | 06/12/1941 | 6415 | Transfer in from: | NEA | Neasden | ||
Steam | H2 | 4-4-4T | on | 06/12/1941 | 6421 | Transfer in from: | NEA | Neasden | ||
Steam | H2 | 4-4-4T | on | 07/12/1941 | 6417 | Transfer in from: | NEA | Neasden | ||
Steam | H2 | 4-4-4T | on | 12/12/1941 | 6421 | Transfer out to: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | H2 | 4-4-4T | on | 12/12/1941 | 6422 | Transfer out to: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 17/03/1942 | 2696 | Transfer out to: | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 17/03/1942 | 2976 | Transfer out to: | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 21/03/1942 | 4414 | Transfer in from: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 21/03/1942 | 4446 | Transfer in from: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 13/05/1942 | 2696 | Transfer in from: | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 14/05/1942 | 2976 | Transfer in from: | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | H2 | 4-4-4T | on | 18/07/1942 | 6422 | Transfer in from: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/07/1942 | 6573 | Transfer out to: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 24/07/1942 | 6586 | Transfer out to: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 30/07/1942 | 6540 | Transfer out to: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | H2 | 4-4-4T | on | 14/08/1942 | 6420 | Transfer in from: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 03/09/1942 | 5391 | Transfer in from: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 03/09/1942 | 5008 | Transfer out to: | WHL | West Hartlepool | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 03/09/1942 | 6211 | Transfer out to: | WHL | West Hartlepool | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 04/09/1942 | 6586 | Transfer in from: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 30/01/1943 | 6295 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 01/02/1943 | 6336 | Transfer out to: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 21/03/1943 | 6275 | Transfer in from: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 21/03/1943 | 6336 | Transfer in from: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | B18 | 4-6-0 | on | 05/04/1943 | 5195 | Transfer out to: | LEI | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 05/06/1943 | 1268 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | B8 | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1943 | 5444 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | B18 | 4-6-0 | on | 04/07/1943 | 5195 | Transfer in from: | LEI | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 31/07/1943 | 3275 | Transfer out to: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 08/08/1943 | 3089 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 09/08/1943 | 1287 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 09/08/1943 | 1289 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 09/08/1943 | 2780 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 09/08/1943 | 2781 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 09/08/1943 | 2975 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | B8 | 4-6-0 | on | 09/08/1943 | 5441 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | B8 | 4-6-0 | on | 09/08/1943 | 5443 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | B8 | 4-6-0 | on | 10/08/1943 | 5439 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 14/08/1943 | 2710 | Transfer in from: | LEI | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | B8 | 4-6-0 | on | 15/08/1943 | 5445 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 05/09/1943 | 6546 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 06/09/1943 | 6229 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 06/09/1943 | 6533 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 06/09/1943 | 6604 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/09/1943 | 6253 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/09/1943 | 6254 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/09/1943 | 6531 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/09/1943 | 6535 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | H2 | 4-4-4T | on | 23/09/1943 | 6419 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 03/10/1943 | 1289 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 03/10/1943 | 2781 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 26/10/1943 | 2780 | Transfer out to: | DAR | Darlington | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 06/11/1943 | 1273 | Transfer out to: | DAR | Darlington | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 29/12/1943 | 3278 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 29/12/1943 | 4402 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | B18 | 4-6-0 | on | 16/01/1944 | 5195 | Transfer out to: | LEI | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/01/1944 | 6594 | Transfer in from: | WHL | West Hartlepool | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/01/1944 | 6606 | Transfer out to: | WHL | West Hartlepool | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/01/1944 | 3461 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/01/1944 | 3477 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/01/1944 | 3478 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/01/1944 | 3479 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/01/1944 | 3480 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/01/1944 | 3483 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/01/1944 | 3484 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/01/1944 | 3485 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/01/1944 | 3486 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/01/1944 | 3487 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/01/1944 | 3488 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/01/1944 | 3489 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/01/1944 | 3490 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/01/1944 | 3492 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/01/1944 | 3493 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/01/1944 | 3494 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/01/1944 | 3495 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/01/1944 | 3497 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/01/1944 | 3498 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/01/1944 | 3833 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/01/1944 | 3834 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/01/1944 | 3835 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/01/1944 | 3836 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/01/1944 | 3837 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/01/1944 | 3838 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/01/1944 | 3839 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/01/1944 | 3840 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/01/1944 | 3841 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/01/1944 | 3842 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/01/1944 | 3843 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/01/1944 | 3844 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/01/1944 | 3848 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/01/1944 | 3850 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/01/1944 | 3851 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/01/1944 | 3852 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/01/1944 | 3853 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/01/1944 | 3854 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/01/1944 | 3855 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/01/1944 | 3856 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/01/1944 | 3857 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/01/1944 | 5385 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/01/1944 | 5387 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/01/1944 | 5391 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/01/1944 | 5399 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/01/1944 | 5405 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/01/1944 | 6214 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/01/1944 | 6218 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/01/1944 | 6229 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/01/1944 | 6246 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/01/1944 | 6249 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/01/1944 | 6253 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/01/1944 | 6254 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/01/1944 | 6257 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/01/1944 | 6264 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/01/1944 | 6270 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/01/1944 | 6275 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/01/1944 | 6311 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/01/1944 | 6336 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/01/1944 | 6338 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/01/1944 | 6353 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/01/1944 | 6354 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/01/1944 | 6361 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/01/1944 | 6363 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/01/1944 | 6510 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/01/1944 | 6521 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/01/1944 | 6528 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/01/1944 | 6531 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/01/1944 | 6533 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/01/1944 | 6535 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/01/1944 | 6545 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/01/1944 | 6546 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/01/1944 | 6575 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/01/1944 | 6586 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/01/1944 | 6594 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/01/1944 | 6601 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/01/1944 | 6604 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/01/1944 | 6624 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/01/1944 | 6626 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 25/01/1944 | 3849 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/02/1944 | 6308 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 19/02/1944 | 3481 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 19/02/1944 | 3482 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 29/03/1944 | 3486 | Transfer out to: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 29/03/1944 | 3854 | Transfer out to: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 29/03/1944 | 3856 | Transfer out to: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 29/03/1944 | 3857 | Transfer out to: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 05/07/1944 | 3291 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 10/07/1944 | 3289 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 14/07/1944 | 4453 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 17/07/1944 | 3298 | Transfer in from: | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 11/09/1944 | 6255 | Transfer in from: | FRO | Frodingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 11/09/1944 | 6571 | Transfer in from: | FRO | Frodingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/09/1944 | 6192 | Transfer in from: | FRO | Frodingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/09/1944 | 6568 | Transfer in from: | FRO | Frodingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/09/1944 | 5010 | Transfer in from: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/09/1944 | 6252 | Transfer in from: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/09/1944 | 6526 | Transfer in from: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 19/09/1944 | 5069 | Transfer in from: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 19/09/1944 | 5093 | Transfer in from: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 19/09/1944 | 6224 | Transfer in from: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 19/09/1944 | 6227 | Transfer in from: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 19/09/1944 | 6344 | Transfer in from: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 19/09/1944 | 6591 | Transfer in from: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/09/1944 | 6512 | Transfer in from: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 21/09/1944 | 3479 | Transfer out to: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 21/09/1944 | 3489 | Transfer out to: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 21/09/1944 | 3492 | Transfer out to: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 24/09/1944 | 3490 | Transfer out to: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 24/09/1944 | 3493 | Transfer out to: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 24/09/1944 | 3497 | Transfer out to: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 24/09/1944 | 3498 | Transfer out to: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 30/09/1944 | 5010 | Transfer out to: | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 30/09/1944 | 6192 | Transfer out to: | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 15/10/1944 | 3289 | Transfer out to: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 28/10/1944 | 4414 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 24/11/1944 | 6245 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 21/12/1944 | 3480 | Transfer out to: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 22/12/1944 | 6226 | Transfer in from: | FRO | Frodingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 24/12/1944 | 6231 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 24/12/1944 | 6242 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 24/12/1944 | 6263 | Transfer in from: | FRO | Frodingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 24/12/1944 | 6561 | Transfer in from: | FRO | Frodingham | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 24/12/1944 | 3461 | Transfer out to: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 24/12/1944 | 3477 | Transfer out to: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 24/12/1944 | 3478 | Transfer out to: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 17/01/1945 | 6306 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 17/01/1945 | 6310 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 17/01/1945 | 6375 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 17/01/1945 | 3481 | Transfer out to: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 17/01/1945 | 3482 | Transfer out to: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 17/01/1945 | 3483 | Transfer out to: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 17/01/1945 | 3484 | Transfer out to: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 17/01/1945 | 3485 | Transfer out to: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 17/01/1945 | 3487 | Transfer out to: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 17/01/1945 | 3488 | Transfer out to: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 17/01/1945 | 3494 | Transfer out to: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 17/01/1945 | 3495 | Transfer out to: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 17/01/1945 | 3833 | Transfer out to: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 28/01/1945 | 5388 | Transfer in from: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 28/01/1945 | 6210 | Transfer in from: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 28/01/1945 | 6222 | Transfer in from: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 28/01/1945 | 6285 | Transfer in from: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 28/01/1945 | 6559 | Transfer in from: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 16/02/1945 | 2780 | Transfer in from: | DAR | Darlington | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 04/04/1945 | 3298 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 05/04/1945 | 1273 | Transfer in from: | DAR | Darlington | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 16/04/1945 | 4630 | Transfer in from: | BOS | Boston | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 16/04/1945 | 4649 | Transfer in from: | BOS | Boston | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 16/04/1945 | 4659 | Transfer in from: | BOS | Boston | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 16/04/1945 | 4665 | Transfer in from: | BOS | Boston | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 16/04/1945 | 4681 | Transfer in from: | BOS | Boston | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 21/04/1945 | 3291 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 22/04/1945 | 6302 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 22/04/1945 | 6556 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 03/06/1945 | 6331 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 03/06/1945 | 6263 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 25/06/1945 | 3461 | Transfer in from: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 25/06/1945 | 3477 | Transfer in from: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 25/06/1945 | 3478 | Transfer in from: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 25/06/1945 | 3479 | Transfer in from: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 25/06/1945 | 3480 | Transfer in from: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 25/06/1945 | 3481 | Transfer in from: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 25/06/1945 | 3482 | Transfer in from: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 25/06/1945 | 3483 | Transfer in from: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 26/07/1945 | 4408 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 21/10/1945 | 6269 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 21/10/1945 | 6231 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 02/12/1945 | 3461 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 05/12/1945 | 3480 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 05/12/1945 | 3481 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 05/12/1945 | 3482 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 09/12/1945 | 3477 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 09/12/1945 | 3478 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 09/12/1945 | 3479 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 09/12/1945 | 3483 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 09/12/1945 | 3834 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 09/12/1945 | 3855 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | H2 | 4-4-4T | on | 03/01/1946 | 7515 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 14/01/1946 | 1268 | Transfer out to: | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | D3 | 4-4-0 | m/e | 02/1946 | 2117 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | D3 | 4-4-0 | m/e | 02/1946 | 2129 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | H2 | 4-4-4T | on | 04/03/1946 | 7510 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 31/03/1946 | 1854 | Transfer out to: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 31/03/1946 | 1857 | Transfer out to: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 31/03/1946 | 4952 | Transfer out to: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | H2 | 4-4-4T | on | 04/05/1946 | 7516 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B18 | 4-6-0 | on | 05/05/1946 | 1471 | Transfer in from: | LEI | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | H2 | 4-4-4T | on | 21/05/1946 | 7513 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 16/06/1946 | 6291 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 16/06/1946 | 6526 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 02/07/1946 | 4641 | Transfer out to: | BOS | Boston | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 02/07/1946 | 4665 | Transfer out to: | BOS | Boston | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 27/07/1946 | 2883 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 18/08/1946 | 1727 | Transfer in from: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 18/08/1946 | 1732 | Transfer in from: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 18/08/1946 | 1741 | Transfer in from: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/08/1946 | 3725 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/08/1946 | 3768 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/08/1946 | 3780 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/08/1946 | 3796 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/08/1946 | 3808 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/08/1946 | 3863 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/08/1946 | 3869 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/08/1946 | 3872 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/08/1946 | 3879 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 18/08/1946 | 4633 | Transfer in from: | BFD | Bradford Hammerton Street | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 18/08/1946 | 4666 | Transfer in from: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 18/08/1946 | 4668 | Transfer in from: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 18/08/1946 | 4678 | Transfer in from: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 18/08/1946 | 4679 | Transfer in from: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/08/1946 | 6213 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/08/1946 | 6220 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/08/1946 | 6243 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/08/1946 | 6263 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/08/1946 | 6324 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/08/1946 | 6341 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/08/1946 | 6356 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/08/1946 | 6359 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/08/1946 | 6371 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/08/1946 | 6526 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/08/1946 | 6545 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 18/08/1946 | 2696 | Transfer out to: | BFD | Bradford Hammerton Street | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 18/08/1946 | 2780 | Transfer out to: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 18/08/1946 | 2785 | Transfer out to: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 18/08/1946 | 3089 | Transfer out to: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 18/08/1946 | 3095 | Transfer out to: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 18/08/1946 | 4729 | Transfer out to: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 18/08/1946 | 4738 | Transfer out to: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 18/08/1946 | 4836 | Transfer out to: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 21/08/1946 | 1722 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 21/08/1946 | 1735 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 23/08/1946 | 1724 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 23/08/1946 | 1728 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 23/08/1946 | 1763 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 23/08/1946 | 4636 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 23/08/1946 | 4661 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 23/08/1946 | 2987 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 23/08/1946 | 4908 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 23/08/1946 | 4910 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 23/08/1946 | 4984 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 14/09/1946 | 4951 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/10/1946 | 70848 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B18 | 4-6-0 | on | 20/10/1946 | 1480 | Transfer out to: | NEA | Neasden | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 20/10/1946 | 2811 | Transfer out to: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 20/10/1946 | 2876 | Transfer out to: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/10/1946 | 3670 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/10/1946 | 3725 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/10/1946 | 3768 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/10/1946 | 3780 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/10/1946 | 3796 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/10/1946 | 3808 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/10/1946 | 3817 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/10/1946 | 3841 | Transfer out to: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/10/1946 | 3842 | Transfer out to: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/10/1946 | 3848 | Transfer out to: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/10/1946 | 3850 | Transfer out to: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/10/1946 | 3863 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/10/1946 | 3869 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/10/1946 | 3872 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/10/1946 | 3879 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/10/1946 | 3967 | Transfer out to: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/10/1946 | 3969 | Transfer out to: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/10/1946 | 3970 | Transfer out to: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/10/1946 | 3973 | Transfer out to: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/10/1946 | 3974 | Transfer out to: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/10/1946 | 3981 | Transfer out to: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/10/1946 | 3983 | Transfer out to: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/10/1946 | 6213 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/10/1946 | 6220 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/10/1946 | 6243 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/10/1946 | 6245 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/10/1946 | 6324 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/10/1946 | 6341 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/10/1946 | 6359 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/10/1946 | 6371 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/10/1946 | 6526 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/10/1946 | 6545 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 27/10/1946 | 3546 | Transfer in from: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 27/10/1946 | 3609 | Transfer in from: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 27/10/1946 | 3695 | Transfer in from: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 27/10/1946 | 3699 | Transfer in from: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 27/10/1946 | 3713 | Transfer in from: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 27/10/1946 | 3729 | Transfer in from: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 27/10/1946 | 3749 | Transfer in from: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 27/10/1946 | 3750 | Transfer in from: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 27/10/1946 | 3794 | Transfer in from: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 27/10/1946 | 3798 | Transfer in from: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 27/10/1946 | 3801 | Transfer in from: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 27/10/1946 | 3858 | Transfer in from: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 27/10/1946 | 3876 | Transfer in from: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 27/10/1946 | 3893 | Transfer in from: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 27/10/1946 | 3895 | Transfer in from: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 27/10/1946 | 6206 | Transfer in from: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 27/10/1946 | 6218 | Transfer in from: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 27/10/1946 | 6249 | Transfer in from: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 27/10/1946 | 6358 | Transfer in from: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 27/10/1946 | 6376 | Transfer in from: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 28/10/1946 | 3836 | Transfer out to: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 24/11/1946 | 3721 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 01/12/1946 | 3721 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | on | 05/01/1947 | 4317 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/03/1947 | 4716 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/03/1947 | 4719 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/03/1947 | 4720 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/03/1947 | 4739 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/03/1947 | 4747 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/03/1947 | 4750 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/03/1947 | 4757 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/03/1947 | 4762 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/03/1947 | 4805 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/03/1947 | 4955 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/03/1947 | 4980 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 30/03/1947 | 3613 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 30/03/1947 | 3636 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 30/03/1947 | 3756 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 30/03/1947 | 3762 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 30/03/1947 | 3876 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 27/04/1947 | 4732 | Transfer in from: | BRN | Barnsley | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 27/04/1947 | 4735 | Transfer in from: | BRN | Barnsley | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 27/04/1947 | 4827 | Transfer in from: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 27/04/1947 | 4828 | Transfer in from: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 27/04/1947 | 4974 | Transfer in from: | BRN | Barnsley | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 27/04/1947 | 1720 | Transfer out to: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 27/04/1947 | 1722 | Transfer out to: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 27/04/1947 | 1724 | Transfer out to: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 27/04/1947 | 1727 | Transfer out to: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 27/04/1947 | 1728 | Transfer out to: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 27/04/1947 | 1733 | Transfer out to: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 27/04/1947 | 1735 | Transfer out to: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 27/04/1947 | 1739 | Transfer out to: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | B18 | 4-6-0 | on | 26/06/1947 | 1479 | Transfer in from: | NEA | Neasden | ||
Steam | B18 | 4-6-0 | on | 26/06/1947 | 1480 | Transfer in from: | NEA | Neasden | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 29/06/1947 | 3605 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 29/06/1947 | 3613 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 29/06/1947 | 3614 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 29/06/1947 | 3635 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 29/06/1947 | 3636 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 29/06/1947 | 3681 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | D3 | 4-4-0 | m/e | 08/1947 | 2138 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J3 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 08/1947 | 4113 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B18 | 4-6-0 | on | 21/09/1947 | 1479 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | B18 | 4-6-0 | on | 21/09/1947 | 1480 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 05/10/1947 | 3965 | Transfer out to: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 05/10/1947 | 3968 | Transfer out to: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 05/10/1947 | 3979 | Transfer out to: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 05/10/1947 | 3982 | Transfer out to: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/10/1947 | 3571 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/10/1947 | 3580 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/10/1947 | 3582 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/10/1947 | 3589 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/10/1947 | 3596 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/10/1947 | 3614 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/10/1947 | 3631 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/10/1947 | 3635 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/10/1947 | 3638 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/10/1947 | 3662 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/10/1947 | 3681 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/10/1947 | 3699 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/10/1947 | 3716 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/10/1947 | 3722 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/10/1947 | 3742 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/10/1947 | 3743 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/10/1947 | 3794 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/10/1947 | 3801 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/10/1947 | 3804 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/10/1947 | 3809 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/10/1947 | 3841 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/10/1947 | 3893 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | H2 | 4-4-4T | on | 17/10/1947 | 7512 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 26/10/1947 | 3685 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 26/10/1947 | 3739 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 09/11/1947 | 3609 | Transfer out to: | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 09/11/1947 | 3613 | Transfer out to: | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 09/11/1947 | 3746 | Transfer out to: | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 09/11/1947 | 3749 | Transfer out to: | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 15/11/1947 | 3069 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | H2 | 4-4-4T | on | 20/11/1947 | 7511 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1650 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1651 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1652 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1653 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1657 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1662 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1664 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1667 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1669 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1801 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1802 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1808 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1816 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1821 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1824 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1826 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1865 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1894 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1905 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D3 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2116 | Snapshot | YK | York (North) | ||
Steam | D3 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2123 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D3 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2125 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D3 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2126 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D3 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2135 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D3 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2140 | Snapshot | DAR | Darlington | ||
Steam | D2 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2150 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D2 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2151 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D2 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2153 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D2 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2169 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D2 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2177 | Snapshot | HIT | Hitchin (GNR) | ||
Steam | D2 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2187 | Snapshot | LTH | Louth | ||
Steam | D2 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2188 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D2 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2193 | Snapshot | YK | York (North) | ||
Steam | D2 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2194 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D2 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2198 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D2 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2199 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4194 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4197 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4199 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4200 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4202 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4212 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4213 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4215 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4222 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4223 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4224 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4230 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4231 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4233 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4253 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4269 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J1 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5003 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J1 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5008 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J1 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5010 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J1 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5013 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J1 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5014 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J5 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5480 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J5 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5481 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J5 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5482 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J5 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5483 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J5 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5484 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J5 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5485 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J5 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5486 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J5 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5487 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J5 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5488 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J5 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5489 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J5 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5490 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J5 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5491 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J5 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5492 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J5 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5493 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J5 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5494 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J5 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5495 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J5 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5496 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J5 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5497 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J5 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5498 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J5 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5499 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8527 | Snapshot | BOS | Boston | ||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | on | 01/01/1948 | 8762 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | on | 01/01/1948 | 8767 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | on | 01/01/1948 | 8768 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | on | 01/01/1948 | 8779 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | on | 01/01/1948 | 8792 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | on | 01/01/1948 | 8807 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | on | 01/01/1948 | 8810 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | on | 01/01/1948 | 8812 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | on | 01/01/1948 | 8814 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | on | 01/01/1948 | 8839 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | on | 01/01/1948 | 8858 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | on | 01/01/1948 | 8859 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | on | 01/01/1948 | 8863 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | on | 01/01/1948 | 8867 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | on | 01/01/1948 | 8875 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | on | 01/01/1948 | 8882 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | on | 01/01/1948 | 8887 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8981 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8982 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9263 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9279 | Snapshot | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9286 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9312 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9324 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N2 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9501 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N2 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9550 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N2 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9552 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N2 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9555 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N2 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9560 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D2 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 03/01/1948 | 2193 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | D2 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 03/01/1948 | 2193 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 04/01/1948 | 1732 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 08/01/1948 | 3851 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 28/01/1948 | 1282 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 01/02/1948 | 3631 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 01/02/1948 | 3829 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 01/02/1948 | 3899 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 01/02/1948 | 3068 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 02/02/1948 | 1283 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 07/02/1948 | 3631 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 07/02/1948 | 3829 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 07/02/1948 | 3899 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 07/02/1948 | 3631 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 07/02/1948 | 3829 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 07/02/1948 | 3899 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 08/02/1948 | 3638 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 08/02/1948 | 3662 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 08/02/1948 | 3700 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 08/02/1948 | 3720 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 08/02/1948 | 3801 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 12/02/1948 | 1209 | Transfer in from: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 14/02/1948 | 1209 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 14/02/1948 | 3638 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 14/02/1948 | 3662 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 14/02/1948 | 3700 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 14/02/1948 | 3720 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 14/02/1948 | 3801 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 14/02/1948 | 3851 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 14/02/1948 | 1209 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 14/02/1948 | 3638 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 14/02/1948 | 3662 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 14/02/1948 | 3700 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 14/02/1948 | 3720 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 14/02/1948 | 3801 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 14/02/1948 | 3851 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 14/02/1948 | 63069 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 21/02/1948 | 1667 | Transfer out to: | LIN | Lincoln | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 22/02/1948 | 1732 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 28/02/1948 | 1732 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 28/02/1948 | 63056 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 28/02/1948 | 77085 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 28/02/1948 | 1650 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 28/02/1948 | 1669 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 28/02/1948 | 1732 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 06/03/1948 | 8972 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 21/03/1948 | 1209 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 27/03/1948 | 1895 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 28/03/1948 | 3694 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 28/03/1948 | 3762 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 28/03/1948 | 3750 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 28/03/1948 | 3895 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 03/04/1948 | 3694 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 03/04/1948 | 3762 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 03/04/1948 | 3694 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 03/04/1948 | 3762 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 11/04/1948 | 3599 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 11/04/1948 | 3713 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 17/04/1948 | 63021 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 17/04/1948 | 63027 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 17/04/1948 | 9360 | Transfer in from: | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 17/04/1948 | 4317 | Transfer out to: | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/04/1948 | 3573 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/04/1948 | 3781 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | J5 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 08/05/1948 | 5486 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | J5 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 08/05/1948 | 5487 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | J5 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 08/05/1948 | 5486 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | J5 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 08/05/1948 | 5487 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 08/05/1948 | 9312 | Transfer out to: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 08/05/1948 | 9324 | Transfer out to: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 09/05/1948 | 3685 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 09/05/1948 | 63605 | Transfer out to: | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 15/05/1948 | 3685 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 15/05/1948 | 3685 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/05/1948 | 3068 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/05/1948 | 3641 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/05/1948 | 3721 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/05/1948 | 3827 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/05/1948 | 3848 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 29/05/1948 | 63025 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 29/05/1948 | 63036 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 29/05/1948 | 63069 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 29/05/1948 | 63157 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 29/05/1948 | 63184 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 29/05/1948 | 1865 | Transfer out to: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 29/05/1948 | 3639 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 06/06/1948 | 3797 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 06/06/1948 | 3798 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 06/06/1948 | 3899 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 06/06/1948 | 63662 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 13/06/1948 | 3720 | Transfer out to: | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | J1 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 19/06/1948 | 5007 | Transfer in from: | LEI | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | J1 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 19/06/1948 | 5003 | Transfer out to: | HIT | Hitchin (GNR) | ||
Steam | J1 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 19/06/1948 | 5010 | Transfer out to: | HIT | Hitchin (GNR) | ||
Steam | J1 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 19/06/1948 | 5013 | Transfer out to: | HIT | Hitchin (GNR) | ||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 19/06/1948 | 9286 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 26/06/1948 | 63073 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | D2 | 4-4-0 | on | 02/07/1948 | 2169 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 04/07/1948 | 3756 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 04/07/1948 | 63695 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 10/07/1948 | 3756 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 10/07/1948 | 3756 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | D3 | 4-4-0 | m/e | 08/1948 | 2126 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J1 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 14/08/1948 | 5009 | Transfer in from: | LEI | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 14/08/1948 | 1802 | Transfer out to: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 14/08/1948 | 1894 | Transfer out to: | LIN | Lincoln | ||
Steam | J5 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 14/08/1948 | 5495 | Transfer out to: | LEI | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 14/08/1948 | 61905 | Transfer out to: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | D2 | 4-4-0 | on | 27/08/1948 | 2198 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 28/08/1948 | 63088 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 28/08/1948 | 78522 | Transfer in from: | RDG | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 29/08/1948 | 63056 | Transfer out to: | NEV | Neville Hill | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 29/08/1948 | 63068 | Transfer out to: | NEV | Neville Hill | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 04/09/1948 | 70834 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 04/09/1948 | 77013 | Transfer in from: | YK | York (North) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 04/09/1948 | 77032 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 04/09/1948 | 77042 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 04/09/1948 | 77075 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 04/09/1948 | 77338 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 04/09/1948 | 77372 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 04/09/1948 | 77499 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 04/09/1948 | 78526 | Transfer in from: | YK | York (North) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 04/09/1948 | 78553 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 04/09/1948 | 78598 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 04/09/1948 | 78643 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 04/09/1948 | 78650 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 04/09/1948 | 78684 | Transfer in from: | YK | York (North) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 04/09/1948 | 79243 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 04/09/1948 | 79263 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 04/09/1948 | 79280 | Transfer in from: | HLS | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 04/09/1948 | 63021 | Transfer out to: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 04/09/1948 | 63027 | Transfer out to: | NEV | Neville Hill | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 04/09/1948 | 63069 | Transfer out to: | NEV | Neville Hill | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 04/09/1948 | 63157 | Transfer out to: | YK | York (North) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 18/09/1948 | 63002 | Transfer in from: | HSY | Hornsey | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 18/09/1948 | 63170 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 18/09/1948 | 77047 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 18/09/1948 | 77057 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 18/09/1948 | 77061 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 18/09/1948 | 63088 | Transfer out to: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 18/09/1948 | 78522 | Transfer out to: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 19/09/1948 | 3721 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 19/09/1948 | 3894 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 19/09/1948 | 63762 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 19/09/1948 | 63829 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 25/09/1948 | 3721 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 25/09/1948 | 3894 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | J5 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 25/09/1948 | 5488 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | J5 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 25/09/1948 | 65489 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 25/09/1948 | 3721 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 25/09/1948 | 3894 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | J5 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 25/09/1948 | 5488 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | J5 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 25/09/1948 | 65489 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | D3 | 4-4-0 | m/e | 10/1948 | 2116 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | D2 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/10/1948 | 2187 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | D2 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 09/10/1948 | 2173 | Transfer in from: | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | D2 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 09/10/1948 | 2190 | Transfer in from: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 30/10/1948 | 61650 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 30/10/1948 | 1664 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | J5 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 30/10/1948 | 5497 | Transfer out to: | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 30/10/1948 | 77085 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 30/10/1948 | 77372 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 30/10/1948 | 78643 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 06/11/1948 | 1865 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 13/11/1948 | 63070 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 13/11/1948 | 63174 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 14/11/1948 | 63638 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 14/11/1948 | 63801 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 20/11/1948 | 4301 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | D2 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 20/11/1948 | 4396 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 21/11/1948 | 61111 | Transfer in from: | LEI | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 21/11/1948 | 1282 | Transfer out to: | LEI | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 22/11/1948 | 61092 | Transfer in from: | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 27/11/1948 | 61092 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 27/11/1948 | 61111 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 27/11/1948 | 61092 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 27/11/1948 | 61111 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 28/11/1948 | 63894 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 04/12/1948 | 77118 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 04/12/1948 | 77181 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 04/12/1948 | 77235 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 04/12/1948 | 77261 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 04/12/1948 | 77292 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 04/12/1948 | 77334 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 04/12/1948 | 63070 | Transfer out to: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 04/12/1948 | 63174 | Transfer out to: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | J5 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 11/12/1948 | 5497 | Transfer in from: | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | J1 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 11/12/1948 | 5009 | Transfer out to: | LEI | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 26/12/1948 | 3573 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 26/12/1948 | 63851 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 01/01/1949 | 3573 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 01/01/1949 | 3573 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/01/1949 | 63575 | Transfer in from: | SDN | Swindon | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/01/1949 | 63700 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 29/01/1949 | 63575 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 29/01/1949 | 77085 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 29/01/1949 | 77372 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 29/01/1949 | 63184 | Transfer out to: | THJ | Thornton Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 29/01/1949 | 63575 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 30/01/1949 | 3713 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 30/01/1949 | 63694 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 05/02/1949 | 3713 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 05/02/1949 | 3713 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 06/02/1949 | 63580 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 06/02/1949 | 63858 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/02/1949 | 63580 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/02/1949 | 63580 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | D2 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 26/02/1949 | 4396 | Transfer out to: | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 27/02/1949 | 63685 | Transfer out to: | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 06/03/1949 | 63783 | Transfer in from: | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/03/1949 | 63783 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/03/1949 | 63783 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | D2 | 4-4-0 | m/e | 04/1949 | 62151 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | D2 | 4-4-0 | m/e | 04/1949 | 62153 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 02/04/1949 | 64375 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | J5 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 02/04/1949 | 65482 | Transfer out to: | LEI | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | D2 | 4-4-0 | m/e | 05/1949 | 62150 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | D3 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 14/05/1949 | 62148 | Transfer in from: | HIT | Hitchin (GNR) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 14/05/1949 | 63043 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 14/05/1949 | 63127 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 15/05/1949 | 63674 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 15/05/1949 | 63781 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | D2 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 21/05/1949 | 62172 | Transfer in from: | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 21/05/1949 | 63116 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 21/05/1949 | 63674 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 21/05/1949 | 63781 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 21/05/1949 | 90636 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 21/05/1949 | 63674 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 21/05/1949 | 63781 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | D2 | 4-4-0 | m/e | 06/1949 | 62193 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | D2 | 4-4-0 | m/e | 06/1949 | 62194 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J2 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 11/06/1949 | 5018 | Transfer in from: | LEI | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | J2 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 11/06/1949 | 5019 | Transfer in from: | LEI | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 11/06/1949 | 64212 | Transfer out to: | LEI | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 11/06/1949 | 64224 | Transfer out to: | LEI | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 18/06/1949 | 61801 | Transfer out to: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 18/06/1949 | 61895 | Transfer out to: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 18/06/1949 | 77181 | Transfer out to: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 19/06/1949 | 61078 | Transfer in from: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 19/06/1949 | 61088 | Transfer in from: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 19/06/1949 | 61131 | Transfer in from: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 25/06/1949 | 61078 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 25/06/1949 | 61088 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 25/06/1949 | 61131 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 25/06/1949 | 68894 | Transfer in from: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 25/06/1949 | 8891 | Transfer in from: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 25/06/1949 | 8920 | Transfer in from: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 25/06/1949 | 61078 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 25/06/1949 | 61088 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 25/06/1949 | 61131 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 25/06/1949 | 61650 | Transfer out to: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 25/06/1949 | 61651 | Transfer out to: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 25/06/1949 | 69360 | Transfer out to: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 25/06/1949 | 9263 | Transfer out to: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | D15 | 4-4-0 | m/e | 07/1949 | 2502 | Transfer in from: | KL | Kings Lynn | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | m/e | 07/1949 | 68894 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | m/e | 07/1949 | 8920 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | m/e | 07/1949 | 68894 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 07/1949 | 77042 | Transfer out to: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 07/1949 | 77047 | Transfer out to: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 07/1949 | 77372 | Transfer out to: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | m/e | 07/1949 | 8920 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | D2 | 4-4-0 | m/e | 07/1949 | 62199 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 10/07/1949 | 63762 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 16/07/1949 | 63762 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 16/07/1949 | 63762 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | D3 | 4-4-0 | m/e | 08/1949 | 62125 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/08/1949 | 63574 | Transfer out to: | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/08/1949 | 63783 | Transfer out to: | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 13/08/1949 | 77480 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 13/08/1949 | 78538 | Transfer in from: | YK | York (North) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 13/08/1949 | 90103 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 13/08/1949 | 90303 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | D2 | 4-4-0 | m/e | 09/1949 | 62190 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | D3 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 10/09/1949 | 62148 | Transfer out to: | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 11/09/1949 | 63735 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 11/09/1949 | 63801 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 17/09/1949 | 63735 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 17/09/1949 | 63801 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 17/09/1949 | 63735 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 17/09/1949 | 63801 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | D3 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 24/09/1949 | 62148 | Transfer in from: | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | D2 | 4-4-0 | m/e | 10/1949 | 62177 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | D2 | 4-4-0 | m/e | 10/1949 | 62188 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | D2 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 05/11/1949 | 62161 | Transfer in from: | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 05/11/1949 | 64212 | Transfer in from: | LEI | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 05/11/1949 | 64224 | Transfer in from: | LEI | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | J2 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 05/11/1949 | 5018 | Transfer out to: | LEI | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | J2 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 05/11/1949 | 5019 | Transfer out to: | LEI | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 06/11/1949 | 61283 | Transfer out to: | LEI | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | D1 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 12/11/1949 | 62203 | Transfer in from: | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/11/1949 | 63876 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 26/11/1949 | 63876 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 26/11/1949 | 63876 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 26/11/1949 | 77334 | Transfer out to: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 26/11/1949 | 90528 | Transfer out to: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | m/e | 30/11/1949 | 8527 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | D3 | 4-4-0 | m/e | 12/1949 | 62123 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 03/12/1949 | 64375 | Transfer out to: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 03/12/1949 | 68981 | Transfer out to: | LEI | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 04/12/1949 | 63631 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 04/12/1949 | 63721 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 11/12/1949 | 69809 | Transfer in from: | BOS | Boston | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 11/12/1949 | 69810 | Transfer in from: | BOS | Boston | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 11/12/1949 | 9817 | Transfer in from: | BOS | Boston | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 11/12/1949 | 4805 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 15/12/1949 | 64732 | Transfer out to: | 14A | Cricklewood East | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | w/e | 17/12/1949 | 69809 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | w/e | 17/12/1949 | 69810 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | w/e | 17/12/1949 | 9817 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | w/e | 17/12/1949 | 69809 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | w/e | 17/12/1949 | 69810 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | w/e | 17/12/1949 | 9817 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 18/12/1949 | 61283 | Transfer in from: | LEI | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/12/1949 | 63638 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/12/1949 | 63829 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/12/1949 | 63894 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/12/1949 | 63580 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/12/1949 | 63674 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/12/1949 | 63787 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 24/12/1949 | 63638 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 24/12/1949 | 63829 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 24/12/1949 | 63894 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 24/12/1949 | 63638 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 24/12/1949 | 63829 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 24/12/1949 | 63894 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 24/12/1949 | 77338 | Transfer out to: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 24/12/1949 | 77480 | Transfer out to: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 30/12/1949 | 69801 | Transfer in from: | NEA | Neasden | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 30/12/1949 | 69814 | Transfer in from: | NEA | Neasden | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | w/e | 31/12/1949 | 69801 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | w/e | 31/12/1949 | 69814 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | J5 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 31/12/1949 | 65494 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | w/e | 31/12/1949 | 69801 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | w/e | 31/12/1949 | 69814 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 31/12/1949 | 78553 | Transfer out to: | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1950 | 61123 | Transfer in from: | LEI | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 05/01/1950 | 69825 | Transfer in from: | NEA | Neasden | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/01/1950 | 61123 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 07/01/1950 | 61812 | Transfer in from: | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 07/01/1950 | 61833 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/01/1950 | 61123 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 08/01/1950 | 61122 | Transfer in from: | LEI | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 08/01/1950 | 63599 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 08/01/1950 | 63787 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 08/01/1950 | 63851 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 08/01/1950 | 61750 | Transfer out to: | BOS | Boston | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 08/01/1950 | 61756 | Transfer out to: | BOS | Boston | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 08/01/1950 | 61770 | Transfer out to: | BOS | Boston | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 08/01/1950 | 63829 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 13/01/1950 | 69823 | Transfer in from: | NEA | Neasden | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 14/01/1950 | 61122 | Transfer out to: | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 14/01/1950 | 63599 | Transfer out to: | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 14/01/1950 | 63787 | Transfer out to: | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 14/01/1950 | 63851 | Transfer out to: | ||||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | w/e | 14/01/1950 | 69823 | Transfer out to: | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 22/01/1950 | 61110 | Transfer in from: | LEI | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 22/01/1950 | 63582 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 22/01/1950 | 63761 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 22/01/1950 | 90628 | Transfer out to: | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 28/01/1950 | 63582 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 28/01/1950 | 63761 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 28/01/1950 | 64342 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 28/01/1950 | 77047 | Transfer in from: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 28/01/1950 | 77209 | Transfer in from: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 28/01/1950 | 8935 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 28/01/1950 | 63582 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 28/01/1950 | 63761 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 29/01/1950 | 69805 | Transfer in from: | NEA | Neasden | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 29/01/1950 | 69807 | Transfer in from: | NEA | Neasden | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | w/e | 04/02/1950 | 69805 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | w/e | 04/02/1950 | 69807 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | w/e | 04/02/1950 | 69805 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | w/e | 04/02/1950 | 69807 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 05/02/1950 | 61141 | Transfer in from: | LEI | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 05/02/1950 | 63804 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 05/02/1950 | 63899 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 05/02/1950 | 61283 | Transfer out to: | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 05/02/1950 | 63575 | Transfer out to: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 05/02/1950 | 63713 | Transfer out to: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | D3 | 4-4-0 | on | 06/02/1950 | 62135 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 11/02/1950 | 61141 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 11/02/1950 | 63804 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 11/02/1950 | 63899 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 11/02/1950 | 61141 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 11/02/1950 | 63804 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 11/02/1950 | 63899 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 12/02/1950 | 69806 | Transfer in from: | NEA | Neasden | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | w/e | 18/02/1950 | 69806 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | w/e | 18/02/1950 | 69806 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | N2 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 04/03/1950 | 69560 | Transfer out to: | 38E | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 05/03/1950 | 69822 | Transfer in from: | NEA | Neasden | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 12/03/1950 | 61283 | Transfer in from: | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 12/03/1950 | 61088 | Transfer out to: | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 12/03/1950 | 61092 | Transfer out to: | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 12/03/1950 | 61141 | Transfer out to: | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 18/03/1950 | 61283 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 18/03/1950 | 61283 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 18/03/1950 | 77209 | Transfer out to: | 38E | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 18/03/1950 | 77261 | Transfer out to: | 38E | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 19/03/1950 | 64729 | Transfer in from: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 19/03/1950 | 69826 | Transfer in from: | NEA | Neasden | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 25/03/1950 | 64729 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | D3 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 25/03/1950 | 62140 | Transfer out to: | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 25/03/1950 | 64342 | Transfer out to: | 39A | Gorton | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 25/03/1950 | 64729 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 26/03/1950 | 64965 | Transfer in from: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 26/03/1950 | 69821 | Transfer in from: | NEA | Neasden | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 02/04/1950 | 63638 | Transfer out to: | 39A | Gorton | ||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 08/04/1950 | 69324 | Transfer in from: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 09/04/1950 | 69312 | Transfer in from: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | D3 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 23/04/1950 | 62140 | Transfer in from: | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/04/1950 | 63829 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 28/04/1950 | 61367 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | D2 | 4-4-0 | m/e | 05/1950 | 62173 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 05/05/1950 | 61368 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | D3 | 4-4-0 | m/e | 06/05/1950 | 62140 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | D3 | 4-4-0 | m/e | 06/05/1950 | 62140 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 14/05/1950 | 4805 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 14/05/1950 | 64807 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 14/05/1950 | 61808 | Transfer out to: | 39A | Gorton | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 14/05/1950 | 61865 | Transfer out to: | 39A | Gorton | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 16/05/1950 | 61369 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 21/05/1950 | 77258 | Transfer in from: | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 21/05/1950 | 90330 | Transfer in from: | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 21/05/1950 | 63582 | Transfer out to: | 39A | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 21/05/1950 | 63876 | Transfer out to: | 39A | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 21/05/1950 | 63899 | Transfer out to: | 39A | Gorton | ||
Steam | J2 | 0-6-0 | 3w/e | 31/05/1950 | 65023 | Transfer in from: | LEI | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 3w/e | 31/05/1950 | 77258 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 3w/e | 31/05/1950 | 90251 | Transfer in from: | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 3w/e | 31/05/1950 | 90330 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 3w/e | 31/05/1950 | 61816 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 3w/e | 31/05/1950 | 61833 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | 3w/e | 31/05/1950 | 64230 | Transfer out to: | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | 3w/e | 31/05/1950 | 64231 | Transfer out to: | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 3w/e | 31/05/1950 | 77258 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 3w/e | 31/05/1950 | 90330 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | D3 | 4-4-0 | m/e | 06/1950 | 62140 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 04/06/1950 | 90251 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 04/06/1950 | 90251 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 25/06/1950 | 90638 | Transfer out to: | 38E | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | J2 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 65023 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | J2 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 65023 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | D2 | 4-4-0 | m/e | 07/1950 | 62161 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J2 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 02/07/1950 | 5018 | Transfer in from: | LEI | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | J2 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 02/07/1950 | 5019 | Transfer in from: | LEI | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 02/07/1950 | 64230 | Transfer in from: | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 02/07/1950 | 64231 | Transfer in from: | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | J1 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 02/07/1950 | 65009 | Transfer in from: | LEI | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 30/07/1950 | 69805 | Transfer out to: | 34E | Neasden | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 30/07/1950 | 69822 | Transfer out to: | 34E | Neasden | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 20/08/1950 | 61816 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 27/08/1950 | 61833 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | D1 | 4-4-0 | on | 31/08/1950 | 62203 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 17/09/1950 | 63573 | Transfer out to: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 17/09/1950 | 63781 | Transfer out to: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/09/1950 | 61833 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/09/1950 | 61833 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 08/10/1950 | 63618 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 08/10/1950 | 63699 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 08/10/1950 | 63723 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 08/10/1950 | 63893 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 08/10/1950 | 64798 | Transfer in from: | 38E | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 08/10/1950 | 64838 | Transfer in from: | 38E | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 08/10/1950 | 63761 | Transfer out to: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 08/10/1950 | 63829 | Transfer out to: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 08/10/1950 | 90111 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 16/10/1950 | 61822 | Transfer in from: | LIN | Lincoln | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 16/10/1950 | 61982 | Transfer in from: | LIN | Lincoln | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/10/1950 | 61822 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/10/1950 | 61982 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/10/1950 | 61822 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/10/1950 | 61982 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 22/10/1950 | 77209 | Transfer in from: | 38E | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 22/10/1950 | 90051 | Transfer in from: | 38E | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 22/10/1950 | 90638 | Transfer in from: | 38E | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 29/10/1950 | 90330 | Transfer out to: | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 29/10/1950 | 90358 | Transfer out to: | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | D3 | 4-4-0 | m/e | 11/1950 | 62148 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 25/11/1950 | 77209 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 25/11/1950 | 90051 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 25/11/1950 | 90122 | Transfer in from: | 24B | Rose Grove | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 25/11/1950 | 90126 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 25/11/1950 | 90140 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 25/11/1950 | 90147 | Transfer in from: | 25D | Mirfield | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 25/11/1950 | 90157 | Transfer in from: | 25A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 25/11/1950 | 90163 | Transfer in from: | 25A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 25/11/1950 | 90178 | Transfer in from: | OXY | Oxley | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 25/11/1950 | 90187 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 25/11/1950 | 90197 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 25/11/1950 | 90204 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 25/11/1950 | 90212 | Transfer in from: | 91M | To London Midland Region | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 25/11/1950 | 90242 | Transfer in from: | 25A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 25/11/1950 | 90638 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 25/11/1950 | 77209 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 25/11/1950 | 90051 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 25/11/1950 | 90638 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 90122 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 90126 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 90140 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 90147 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 90157 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 90163 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 90178 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 90187 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 90197 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 90204 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 90212 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 90242 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 90122 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 90126 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 90140 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 90147 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 90157 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 90163 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 90178 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 90187 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 90197 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 90204 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 90212 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 90242 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | on | 04/12/1950 | 68767 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/12/1950 | 61864 | Transfer in from: | 32C | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/12/1950 | 61652 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/12/1950 | 61653 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | m/e | 31/12/1950 | 61864 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 31/12/1950 | 64406 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 31/12/1950 | 64417 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | m/e | 31/12/1950 | 61864 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 20/01/1951 | 90002 | Transfer out to: | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 20/01/1951 | 90025 | Transfer out to: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 20/01/1951 | 90036 | Transfer out to: | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 20/01/1951 | 90411 | Transfer out to: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 21/01/1951 | 61729 | Transfer in from: | 35B | Grantham | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 28/01/1951 | 61741 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 61729 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 61729 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 04/02/1951 | 64225 | Transfer in from: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 04/02/1951 | 64235 | Transfer in from: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 04/02/1951 | 64238 | Transfer in from: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 04/02/1951 | 64249 | Transfer in from: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 04/02/1951 | 64257 | Transfer in from: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 04/02/1951 | 64273 | Transfer in from: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 04/02/1951 | 69810 | Transfer out to: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 04/02/1951 | 69821 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 04/02/1951 | 69826 | Transfer out to: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/02/1951 | 64225 | Transfer out to: | 38E | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/02/1951 | 64235 | Transfer out to: | 38E | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/02/1951 | 64238 | Transfer out to: | 38E | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/02/1951 | 64249 | Transfer out to: | 38E | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/02/1951 | 64257 | Transfer out to: | 38E | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/02/1951 | 64273 | Transfer out to: | 38E | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 18/02/1951 | 69801 | Transfer out to: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/02/1951 | 90157 | Transfer out to: | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 11/03/1951 | 61747 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 11/03/1951 | 64723 | Transfer in from: | TFD | Trafford Park (LNER) | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 11/03/1951 | 64823 | Transfer in from: | TFD | Trafford Park (LNER) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/03/1951 | 63602 | Transfer in from: | FRO | Frodingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/03/1951 | 63684 | Transfer in from: | FRO | Frodingham | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 24/03/1951 | 90036 | Transfer in from: | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 24/03/1951 | 90358 | Transfer in from: | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 24/03/1951 | 61657 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 24/03/1951 | 90638 | Transfer out to: | 38E | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 24/03/1951 | 90648 | Transfer out to: | 38E | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 31/03/1951 | 63602 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 31/03/1951 | 63684 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 31/03/1951 | 90036 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 31/03/1951 | 90358 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 31/03/1951 | 63602 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 31/03/1951 | 63684 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 31/03/1951 | 90036 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 31/03/1951 | 90358 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 01/04/1951 | 61758 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/04/1951 | 64729 | Transfer out to: | 37A | Ardsley | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/04/1951 | 64831 | Transfer out to: | 37A | Ardsley | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 08/04/1951 | 61738 | Transfer in from: | SL | South Lynn | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 12/04/1951 | 61376 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 14/04/1951 | 61738 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 14/04/1951 | 61738 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 14/04/1951 | 90202 | Transfer out to: | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 28/04/1951 | 69638 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 28/04/1951 | 69651 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 28/04/1951 | 90672 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | N2 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 28/04/1951 | 69550 | Transfer out to: | 34A | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | N2 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 28/04/1951 | 69555 | Transfer out to: | 34A | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 29/04/1951 | 69814 | Transfer out to: | 34E | Neasden | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/05/1951 | 61377 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 05/05/1951 | 69613 | Transfer in from: | HAT | Hatfield | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 05/05/1951 | 69615 | Transfer in from: | HAT | Hatfield | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 05/05/1951 | 69620 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 05/05/1951 | 90202 | Transfer in from: | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 05/05/1951 | 90606 | Transfer in from: | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | N2 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 12/05/1951 | 69501 | Transfer out to: | 34C | Hatfield | ||
Steam | N2 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 12/05/1951 | 69552 | Transfer out to: | 34C | Hatfield | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 69613 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 69615 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 69620 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 69638 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 69651 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 90202 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 90606 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 69613 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 69615 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 69620 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 69638 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 69651 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 90202 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 90606 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 90672 | Transfer out to: | 38E | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 20/05/1951 | 61368 | Transfer out to: | 38E | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 20/05/1951 | 61769 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 20/05/1951 | 64720 | Transfer out to: | 37A | Ardsley | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 20/05/1951 | 64757 | Transfer out to: | 37A | Ardsley | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 20/05/1951 | 64763 | Transfer out to: | 37A | Ardsley | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 20/05/1951 | 64837 | Transfer out to: | 37A | Ardsley | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 20/05/1951 | 64981 | Transfer out to: | 37A | Ardsley | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 25/05/1951 | 61378 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 27/05/1951 | 61367 | Transfer out to: | 38E | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 09/06/1951 | 63839 | Transfer in from: | 39B | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 09/06/1951 | 63877 | Transfer in from: | 39B | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 09/06/1951 | 90634 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 09/06/1951 | 90448 | Transfer out to: | 38E | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 09/06/1951 | 90574 | Transfer out to: | 38E | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 14/06/1951 | 61379 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 16/06/1951 | 69312 | Transfer out to: | 39B | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 16/06/1951 | 69324 | Transfer out to: | 39B | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 19/06/1951 | 63839 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 19/06/1951 | 63839 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | D2 | 4-4-0 | on | 19/06/1951 | 62172 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 23/06/1951 | 90634 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 23/06/1951 | 90634 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 30/06/1951 | 90411 | Transfer in from: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 01/07/1951 | 69801 | Transfer in from: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 01/07/1951 | 69818 | Transfer in from: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 69801 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 69818 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 90330 | Transfer in from: | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 69801 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 69818 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 08/07/1951 | 69810 | Transfer in from: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 08/07/1951 | 61379 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | w/e | 14/07/1951 | 69810 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | w/e | 14/07/1951 | 69810 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 21/07/1951 | 90330 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 21/07/1951 | 90411 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 21/07/1951 | 90330 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 21/07/1951 | 90411 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | 3w/e | 28/07/1951 | 69810 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | 3w/e | 28/07/1951 | 69810 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 05/08/1951 | 64723 | Transfer out to: | 9F | Heaton Mersey | ||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | on | 06/08/1951 | 68762 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 22/08/1951 | 61380 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 26/08/1951 | 69826 | Transfer in from: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | w/e | 01/09/1951 | 69826 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | w/e | 01/09/1951 | 69826 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 02/09/1951 | 63751 | Transfer in from: | 20C | Royston | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 02/09/1951 | 63754 | Transfer in from: | 20C | Royston | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 02/09/1951 | 63772 | Transfer in from: | 20C | Royston | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 02/09/1951 | 63845 | Transfer in from: | 20C | Royston | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 02/09/1951 | 63849 | Transfer in from: | 20C | Royston | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 02/09/1951 | 63857 | Transfer in from: | 20C | Royston | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 02/09/1951 | 63801 | Transfer out to: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 02/09/1951 | 63894 | Transfer out to: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 07/09/1951 | 61381 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 08/09/1951 | 63751 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 08/09/1951 | 63754 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 08/09/1951 | 63772 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 08/09/1951 | 63845 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 08/09/1951 | 63849 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 08/09/1951 | 63857 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 08/09/1951 | 63751 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 08/09/1951 | 63754 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 08/09/1951 | 63772 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 08/09/1951 | 63845 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 08/09/1951 | 63849 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 08/09/1951 | 63857 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 08/09/1951 | 64417 | Transfer out to: | 36D | Barnsley | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 90122 | Transfer out to: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 90126 | Transfer out to: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 90140 | Transfer out to: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 90163 | Transfer out to: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 90197 | Transfer out to: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 90204 | Transfer out to: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/09/1951 | 63628 | Transfer in from: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/09/1951 | 63673 | Transfer in from: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/09/1951 | 63812 | Transfer in from: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/09/1951 | 63816 | Transfer in from: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/09/1951 | 63835 | Transfer in from: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 29/09/1951 | 63628 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 29/09/1951 | 63673 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 29/09/1951 | 63812 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 29/09/1951 | 63816 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 29/09/1951 | 63835 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | J2 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/09/1951 | 65015 | Transfer in from: | LEI | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 29/09/1951 | 90002 | Transfer in from: | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 29/09/1951 | 63628 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 29/09/1951 | 63673 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 29/09/1951 | 63812 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 29/09/1951 | 63816 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 29/09/1951 | 63835 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | J5 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/09/1951 | 65485 | Transfer out to: | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 29/09/1951 | 90043 | Transfer out to: | 38E | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 29/09/1951 | 90411 | Transfer out to: | 38E | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 29/09/1951 | 90532 | Transfer out to: | 38E | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 29/09/1951 | 90697 | Transfer out to: | 38E | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 30/09/1951 | 61110 | Transfer out to: | 38E | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 30/09/1951 | 61123 | Transfer out to: | 37A | Ardsley | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 30/09/1951 | 61376 | Transfer out to: | 38E | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 30/09/1951 | 63618 | Transfer out to: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 30/09/1951 | 63699 | Transfer out to: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 06/10/1951 | 61651 | Transfer in from: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 06/10/1951 | 61667 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 06/10/1951 | 90187 | Transfer out to: | 38E | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 13/10/1951 | 90551 | Transfer out to: | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/10/1951 | 61651 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/10/1951 | 61667 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | J2 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/10/1951 | 65015 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 20/10/1951 | 90002 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/10/1951 | 61651 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/10/1951 | 61667 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | J2 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/10/1951 | 65015 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 20/10/1951 | 90002 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 21/10/1951 | 63762 | Transfer out to: | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | J5 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 27/10/1951 | 65494 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 27/10/1951 | 90187 | Transfer in from: | 38E | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 27/10/1951 | 64406 | Transfer out to: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 04/11/1951 | 63699 | Transfer in from: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 04/11/1951 | 63801 | Transfer in from: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 10/11/1951 | 63699 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 10/11/1951 | 63801 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 10/11/1951 | 90499 | Transfer in from: | 38E | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 10/11/1951 | 63699 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 10/11/1951 | 63801 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 10/11/1951 | 69613 | Transfer out to: | 34C | Hatfield | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 10/11/1951 | 69638 | Transfer out to: | 34C | Hatfield | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 10/11/1951 | 90139 | Transfer out to: | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 10/11/1951 | 90634 | Transfer out to: | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 17/11/1951 | 61651 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 17/11/1951 | 61662 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 17/11/1951 | 61667 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 24/11/1951 | 90287 | Transfer in from: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 25/11/1951 | 61110 | Transfer in from: | 38E | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 25/11/1951 | 61381 | Transfer out to: | 38E | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 01/12/1951 | 61110 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 01/12/1951 | 61110 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 01/12/1951 | 90323 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 01/12/1951 | 90544 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 09/12/1951 | 61110 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 09/12/1951 | 61377 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 90001 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 90139 | Transfer in from: | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 90604 | Transfer in from: | 25A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 69651 | Transfer out to: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 30/12/1951 | 61367 | Transfer in from: | 38E | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 30/12/1951 | 61376 | Transfer in from: | 38E | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 19/01/1952 | 90052 | Transfer in from: | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 61367 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 61376 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 90052 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 61367 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 61376 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 90052 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 27/01/1952 | 61078 | Transfer out to: | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 27/01/1952 | 61367 | Transfer out to: | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | D15 | 4-4-0 | on | 04/02/1952 | 62502 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J1 | 0-6-0 | on | 04/02/1952 | 65007 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 5w/e | 16/02/1952 | 61812 | Transfer out to: | 39A | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 22/02/1952 | 041 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 61977 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 24/02/1952 | 63618 | Transfer in from: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 09/03/1952 | 63735 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 61977 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 63618 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 61977 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 63618 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 68867 | Transfer out to: | 34C | Hatfield | ||
Steam | J1 | 0-6-0 | on | 24/03/1952 | 65008 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 30/03/1952 | 63735 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | J1 | 0-6-0 | on | 31/03/1952 | 65009 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 06/04/1952 | 61269 | Transfer in from: | LIN | Lincoln | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 06/04/1952 | 61280 | Transfer in from: | LIN | Lincoln | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 61269 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 61280 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 63735 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 90411 | Transfer in from: | 38E | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 61269 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 61280 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 63735 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 90251 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 20/04/1952 | 61269 | Transfer out to: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 20/04/1952 | 61280 | Transfer out to: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 27/04/1952 | 61367 | Transfer in from: | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 27/04/1952 | 64891 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 27/04/1952 | 64976 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 27/04/1952 | 64981 | Transfer in from: | 37A | Ardsley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 27/04/1952 | 63772 | Transfer out to: | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 04/05/1952 | 63912 | Transfer in from: | 39A | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 11/05/1952 | 63636 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 11/05/1952 | 63729 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 11/05/1952 | 63893 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 61367 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 63912 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 64891 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 64976 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 64981 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | J1 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 65004 | Transfer in from: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 90007 | Transfer in from: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 90043 | Transfer in from: | 38E | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 90154 | Transfer in from: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 90157 | Transfer in from: | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 90235 | Transfer in from: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 90423 | Transfer in from: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 90432 | Transfer in from: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 90449 | Transfer in from: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 90567 | Transfer in from: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 90618 | Transfer in from: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 90674 | Transfer in from: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 61367 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 63912 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 64891 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 64976 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 64981 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 90147 | Transfer out to: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 90178 | Transfer out to: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 90187 | Transfer out to: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 90212 | Transfer out to: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 90242 | Transfer out to: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 90606 | Transfer out to: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 25/05/1952 | 69826 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | w/e | 09/06/1952 | 68792 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 90346 | Transfer in from: | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 90157 | Transfer out to: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 21/06/1952 | 90346 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 21/06/1952 | 90346 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 29/06/1952 | 61056 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 29/06/1952 | 61192 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 29/06/1952 | 61390 | Transfer in from: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 61056 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 61192 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 61390 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 69621 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 69654 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 61056 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 61192 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 61390 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 90369 | Transfer out to: | 38E | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 19/07/1952 | 68873 | Transfer in from: | 34B | Hornsey | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 19/07/1952 | 69621 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 19/07/1952 | 69654 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 19/07/1952 | 69621 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 19/07/1952 | 69654 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/07/1952 | 63801 | Transfer out to: | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 68873 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 68873 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 31/08/1952 | 63894 | Transfer in from: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 63894 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 90369 | Transfer in from: | 38E | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 90532 | Transfer in from: | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 63894 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 07/09/1952 | 61111 | Transfer out to: | 38E | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 14/09/1952 | 61111 | Transfer in from: | 38E | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 14/09/1952 | 61131 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 20/09/1952 | 68981 | Transfer in from: | LEI | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 20/09/1952 | 90369 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 20/09/1952 | 90532 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 20/09/1952 | 68839 | Transfer out to: | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 20/09/1952 | 90369 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 20/09/1952 | 90532 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 22/09/1952 | 63801 | Transfer in from: | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 22/09/1952 | 63857 | Transfer out to: | 37A | Ardsley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 28/09/1952 | 63639 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 28/09/1952 | 63674 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 28/09/1952 | 63798 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 28/09/1952 | 63851 | Transfer in from: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 63639 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 63674 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 63798 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 63801 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 63851 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 68758 | Transfer in from: | HSY | Hornsey | ||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 68773 | Transfer in from: | HSY | Hornsey | ||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 68781 | Transfer in from: | HSY | Hornsey | ||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 68787 | Transfer in from: | HSY | Hornsey | ||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 68788 | Transfer in from: | HSY | Hornsey | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 68981 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 63639 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 63674 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 63798 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 63801 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 63851 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 68891 | Transfer out to: | 34B | Hornsey | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 68894 | Transfer out to: | 34B | Hornsey | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 68920 | Transfer out to: | 34B | Hornsey | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 68935 | Transfer out to: | 37A | Ardsley | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 68972 | Transfer out to: | 34B | Hornsey | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 68981 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 05/10/1952 | 61737 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 05/10/1952 | 61752 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 05/10/1952 | 61753 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 05/10/1952 | 61754 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 05/10/1952 | 61759 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 05/10/1952 | 61777 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 05/10/1952 | 61780 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 05/10/1952 | 63801 | Transfer out to: | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 05/10/1952 | 64719 | Transfer out to: | 35C | Spital Bridge | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 12/10/1952 | 61106 | Transfer in from: | LEI | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 12/10/1952 | 64723 | Transfer in from: | 9F | Heaton Mersey | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 12/10/1952 | 61369 | Transfer out to: | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 12/10/1952 | 64965 | Transfer out to: | 35C | Spital Bridge | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 13/10/1952 | 64723 | Transfer out to: | 35C | Spital Bridge | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/10/1952 | 64420 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/10/1952 | 64453 | Transfer in from: | NTH | Northwich | ||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 18/10/1952 | 68758 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 18/10/1952 | 68773 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 18/10/1952 | 68781 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 18/10/1952 | 68787 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 18/10/1952 | 68788 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/10/1952 | 61977 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/10/1952 | 61982 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 18/10/1952 | 68758 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 18/10/1952 | 68773 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 18/10/1952 | 68781 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 18/10/1952 | 68787 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 18/10/1952 | 68788 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 19/10/1952 | 61033 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 19/10/1952 | 61378 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 61033 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 61106 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 61737 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 61752 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 61753 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 61754 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 61759 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 61777 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 61780 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 64420 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 64453 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 68777 | Transfer in from: | HSY | Hornsey | ||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 68791 | Transfer in from: | HSY | Hornsey | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 61033 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 61106 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 61737 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 61752 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 61753 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 61754 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 61759 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 61777 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 61780 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 64420 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 64453 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 68981 | Transfer out to: | 34B | Hornsey | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 68982 | Transfer out to: | 34B | Hornsey | ||
Steam | J1 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 15/11/1952 | 65002 | Transfer in from: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | J5 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 15/11/1952 | 65482 | Transfer in from: | 34D | Hitchin (GNR) | ||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 15/11/1952 | 68777 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 15/11/1952 | 68791 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 15/11/1952 | 64197 | Transfer out to: | 34D | Hitchin (GNR) | ||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 15/11/1952 | 64224 | Transfer out to: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 15/11/1952 | 68777 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 15/11/1952 | 68791 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | J1 | 0-6-0 | on | 17/11/1952 | 65004 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J1 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 65002 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | J5 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 65482 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | J1 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 65002 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | J5 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 65482 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 07/12/1952 | 61188 | Transfer in from: | LEI | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 07/12/1952 | 69822 | Transfer in from: | 34E | Neasden | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 07/12/1952 | 61111 | Transfer out to: | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 13/12/1952 | 68851 | Transfer in from: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 13/12/1952 | 68875 | Transfer out to: | 37A | Ardsley | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 13/12/1952 | 90007 | Transfer out to: | 38E | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 61188 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 68851 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 69822 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 61188 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 68851 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 69822 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 90618 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 90618 | Transfer in from: | 40E | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 17/01/1953 | 90007 | Transfer in from: | 38E | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 17/01/1953 | 90618 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 17/01/1953 | 64453 | Transfer out to: | 34E | Neasden | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 17/01/1953 | 90618 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | J3 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 19/01/1953 | 64133 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 25/01/1953 | 61380 | Transfer out to: | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 28/01/1953 | 61111 | Transfer in from: | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 01/02/1953 | 63674 | Transfer out to: | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 14/02/1953 | 90050 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 14/02/1953 | 69621 | Transfer out to: | 38E | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 14/02/1953 | 90330 | Transfer out to: | 36B | Mexborough | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 14/02/1953 | 90358 | Transfer out to: | 36B | Mexborough | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 15/02/1953 | 61186 | Transfer in from: | LEI | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 15/02/1953 | 61106 | Transfer out to: | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | J2 | 0-6-0 | on | 02/03/1953 | 65019 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J5 | 0-6-0 | on | 09/03/1953 | 65484 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 21/03/1953 | 64231 | Transfer out to: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | J3 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 04/1953 | 64122 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 12/04/1953 | 64891 | Transfer out to: | 35C | Spital Bridge | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 12/04/1953 | 64981 | Transfer out to: | 35C | Spital Bridge | ||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | w/e | 13/04/1953 | 68773 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 64375 | Transfer in from: | 34E | Neasden | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 64438 | Transfer in from: | 34E | Neasden | ||
Steam | J5 | 0-6-0 | on | 20/04/1953 | 65499 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 26/04/1953 | 63674 | Transfer in from: | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | on | 27/04/1953 | 68779 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 69271 | Transfer in from: | 37A | Ardsley | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 90263 | Transfer in from: | 38E | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 90648 | Transfer in from: | 38E | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 19/05/1953 | 61188 | Transfer out to: | SR | To Southern Region | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 19/05/1953 | 61192 | Transfer out to: | SR | To Southern Region | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 27/05/1953 | 61188 | Transfer in from: | SR | To Southern Region | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 27/05/1953 | 61192 | Transfer in from: | SR | To Southern Region | ||
Steam | J5 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 08/06/1953 | 65487 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 20/06/1953 | 68798 | Transfer in from: | 36C | Frodingham | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 20/06/1953 | 69621 | Transfer in from: | 38E | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 21/06/1953 | 63766 | Transfer in from: | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 21/06/1953 | 63899 | Transfer in from: | 39A | Gorton | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 25/07/1953 | 90025 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 25/07/1953 | 90162 | Transfer in from: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 25/07/1953 | 90288 | Transfer in from: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 25/07/1953 | 90476 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | J1 | 0-6-0 | on | 05/08/1953 | 65014 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 19/09/1953 | 90038 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 19/09/1953 | 90496 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 19/09/1953 | 90545 | Transfer in from: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 20/09/1953 | 61201 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 20/09/1953 | 61271 | Transfer in from: | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 20/09/1953 | 61272 | Transfer in from: | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/09/1953 | 63647 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/09/1953 | 63649 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/09/1953 | 63657 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/09/1953 | 63658 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/09/1953 | 63729 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/09/1953 | 63745 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/09/1953 | 63807 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/09/1953 | 63832 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/09/1953 | 63881 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/09/1953 | 63908 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 27/09/1953 | 61269 | Transfer in from: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 27/09/1953 | 64735 | Transfer out to: | 40D | Tuxford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 27/09/1953 | 64750 | Transfer out to: | 40D | Tuxford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 27/09/1953 | 64805 | Transfer out to: | 40D | Tuxford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 27/09/1953 | 64807 | Transfer out to: | 40D | Tuxford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 27/09/1953 | 64828 | Transfer out to: | 40D | Tuxford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 27/09/1953 | 64838 | Transfer out to: | 40D | Tuxford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 27/09/1953 | 64976 | Transfer out to: | 40D | Tuxford | ||
Steam | J5 | 0-6-0 | on | 28/09/1953 | 65492 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J5 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 12/10/1953 | 65491 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/10/1953 | 63751 | Transfer out to: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | J5 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 19/10/1953 | 65488 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 24/10/1953 | 90075 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 24/10/1953 | 90296 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 24/10/1953 | 90384 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 24/10/1953 | 90392 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 24/10/1953 | 90433 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 24/10/1953 | 90473 | Transfer in from: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/10/1953 | 61816 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/10/1953 | 61822 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/10/1953 | 61824 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/10/1953 | 61826 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/10/1953 | 61864 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/10/1953 | 64222 | Transfer out to: | 34B | Hornsey | ||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/10/1953 | 64223 | Transfer out to: | 34B | Hornsey | ||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/10/1953 | 64233 | Transfer out to: | 34B | Hornsey | ||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/10/1953 | 64253 | Transfer out to: | 34B | Hornsey | ||
Steam | J5 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 26/10/1953 | 65481 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J5 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 02/11/1953 | 65482 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J2 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 09/11/1953 | 65023 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J2 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/11/1953 | 65018 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/11/1953 | 64183 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/11/1953 | 64218 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/11/1953 | 69286 | Transfer in from: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/11/1953 | 69360 | Transfer in from: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | J5 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 23/11/1953 | 65497 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 29/11/1953 | 63899 | Transfer out to: | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | J5 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/12/1953 | 65489 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J2 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 14/12/1953 | 65015 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/12/1953 | 64369 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 19/12/1953 | 69263 | Transfer in from: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 19/12/1953 | 69310 | Transfer in from: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 27/12/1953 | 63751 | Transfer in from: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 27/12/1953 | 63735 | Transfer out to: | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/01/1954 | 61824 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/01/1954 | 64390 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | N1 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 23/01/1954 | 69451 | Transfer in from: | 34B | Hornsey | ||
Steam | N1 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 23/01/1954 | 69481 | Transfer in from: | HSY | Hornsey | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 23/01/1954 | 90129 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 23/01/1954 | 90411 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | J5 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 08/02/1954 | 65496 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N1 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 20/02/1954 | 69457 | Transfer in from: | HSY | Hornsey | ||
Steam | N1 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 20/02/1954 | 69469 | Transfer in from: | HSY | Hornsey | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 28/02/1954 | 61106 | Transfer in from: | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 21/03/1954 | 63807 | Transfer out to: | 39A | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 21/03/1954 | 63835 | Transfer out to: | 39A | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 21/03/1954 | 63881 | Transfer out to: | 39B | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | N1 | 0-6-2T | 5w/e | 24/04/1954 | 69441 | Transfer in from: | HSY | Hornsey | ||
Steam | N1 | 0-6-2T | 5w/e | 24/04/1954 | 69453 | Transfer in from: | HSY | Hornsey | ||
Steam | N1 | 0-6-2T | 5w/e | 24/04/1954 | 69467 | Transfer in from: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | N1 | 0-6-2T | 5w/e | 24/04/1954 | 69476 | Transfer in from: | HSY | Hornsey | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 24/04/1954 | 90208 | Transfer in from: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 24/04/1954 | 90411 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 24/04/1954 | 90519 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | N1 | 0-6-2T | 5w/e | 24/04/1954 | 69469 | Transfer out to: | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 5w/e | 24/04/1954 | 69615 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 5w/e | 24/04/1954 | 69620 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 5w/e | 24/04/1954 | 69621 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 5w/e | 24/04/1954 | 69654 | Transfer out to: | 34C | Hatfield | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 90369 | Transfer out to: | 2E | Northampton | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 90392 | Transfer out to: | 2E | Northampton | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 90423 | Transfer out to: | 2E | Northampton | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 90532 | Transfer out to: | 2E | Northampton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 13/06/1954 | 63599 | Transfer in from: | 39A | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 13/06/1954 | 63614 | Transfer in from: | 39A | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 13/06/1954 | 63638 | Transfer in from: | 39A | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 13/06/1954 | 63829 | Transfer in from: | 39A | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 13/06/1954 | 63841 | Transfer in from: | 39A | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 13/06/1954 | 63859 | Transfer in from: | 39A | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 13/06/1954 | 63873 | Transfer in from: | 39A | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 13/06/1954 | 63876 | Transfer in from: | 39A | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 13/06/1954 | 63891 | Transfer in from: | 39A | Gorton | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 13/06/1954 | 69806 | Transfer out to: | 39A | Gorton | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 13/06/1954 | 69817 | Transfer out to: | 39A | Gorton | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/06/1954 | 61809 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/06/1954 | 61856 | Transfer in from: | 39A | Gorton | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/06/1954 | 61870 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/06/1954 | 61896 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/06/1954 | 61914 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 19/06/1954 | 90043 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 19/06/1954 | 90051 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 19/06/1954 | 90287 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 19/06/1954 | 90411 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 19/06/1954 | 90449 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 19/06/1954 | 90545 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 19/06/1954 | 90567 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 27/06/1954 | 63613 | Transfer in from: | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 27/06/1954 | 63706 | Transfer in from: | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 27/06/1954 | 61192 | Transfer out to: | 38E | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 04/07/1954 | 63835 | Transfer in from: | 39A | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/07/1954 | 63781 | Transfer in from: | 39A | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/07/1954 | 63599 | Transfer out to: | 39B | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/07/1954 | 63658 | Transfer out to: | 39B | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/07/1954 | 63912 | Transfer out to: | 39B | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 24/07/1954 | 90269 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 24/07/1954 | 90276 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | J5 | 0-6-0 | on | 02/08/1954 | 65493 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | on | 02/08/1954 | 68859 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/08/1954 | 64397 | Transfer in from: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 21/08/1954 | 68880 | Transfer in from: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | J1 | 0-6-0 | on | 21/08/1954 | 65002 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/09/1954 | 64288 | Transfer in from: | 35C | Spital Bridge | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/09/1954 | 64453 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | J5 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/09/1954 | 65485 | Transfer in from: | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/09/1954 | 64375 | Transfer out to: | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/09/1954 | 64438 | Transfer out to: | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | J5 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 11/10/1954 | 65490 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 24/10/1954 | 61033 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 24/10/1954 | 61390 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | J5 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 25/10/1954 | 65480 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 07/11/1954 | 61283 | Transfer out to: | 38E | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | w/e | 08/11/1954 | 68791 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | w/e | 08/11/1954 | 68798 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 13/11/1954 | 68821 | Transfer in from: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 13/11/1954 | 68876 | Transfer in from: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | N1 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 13/11/1954 | 69469 | Transfer in from: | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 13/11/1954 | 69263 | Transfer out to: | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 13/11/1954 | 90636 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 13/11/1954 | 90674 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 14/11/1954 | 63804 | Transfer out to: | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 21/11/1954 | 63649 | Transfer out to: | 39A | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 21/11/1954 | 63766 | Transfer out to: | 39A | Gorton | ||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | w/e | 29/11/1954 | 68777 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J5 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 06/12/1954 | 65485 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J5 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 13/12/1954 | 65486 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | w/e | 13/12/1954 | 68781 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 19/12/1954 | 61092 | Transfer in from: | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 19/12/1954 | 61163 | Transfer in from: | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 19/12/1954 | 61201 | Transfer out to: | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 19/12/1954 | 61272 | Transfer out to: | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 6w/e | 25/12/1954 | 64338 | Transfer in from: | 35C | Spital Bridge | ||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | w/e | 27/12/1954 | 68788 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 09/01/1955 | 61111 | Transfer out to: | 38E | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 16/01/1955 | 64735 | Transfer in from: | 40D | Tuxford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 16/01/1955 | 64763 | Transfer in from: | 40D | Tuxford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 16/01/1955 | 64976 | Transfer in from: | 40D | Tuxford | ||
Steam | J5 | 0-6-0 | on | 20/01/1955 | 65494 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 22/01/1955 | 68765 | Transfer in from: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 22/01/1955 | 68826 | Transfer in from: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 22/01/1955 | 68852 | Transfer in from: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 22/01/1955 | 90162 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 06/02/1955 | 61111 | Transfer in from: | 38E | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/02/1955 | 61974 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/02/1955 | 61856 | Transfer out to: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 20/02/1955 | 61272 | Transfer in from: | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 20/02/1955 | 61283 | Transfer in from: | 38E | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | N1 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 14/03/1955 | 69476 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 5w/e | 23/04/1955 | 67769 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 5w/e | 23/04/1955 | 67796 | Transfer in from: | 34E | Neasden | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 5w/e | 23/04/1955 | 67799 | Transfer in from: | 34A | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | N1 | 0-6-2T | 5w/e | 23/04/1955 | 69441 | Transfer out to: | 37C | Bradford Hammerton Street | ||
Steam | N1 | 0-6-2T | 5w/e | 23/04/1955 | 69451 | Transfer out to: | 37C | Bradford Hammerton Street | ||
Steam | N1 | 0-6-2T | 5w/e | 23/04/1955 | 69453 | Transfer out to: | 37A | Ardsley | ||
Steam | N1 | 0-6-2T | 5w/e | 23/04/1955 | 69467 | Transfer out to: | 37C | Bradford Hammerton Street | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 5w/e | 23/04/1955 | 67796 | Transfer out to: | 34A | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 02/05/1955 | 64301 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 02/05/1955 | 64390 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 26/06/1955 | 61737 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 26/06/1955 | 61747 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 26/06/1955 | 61749 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 26/06/1955 | 61759 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 10/07/1955 | 64715 | Transfer in from: | LIN | Lincoln | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 10/07/1955 | 64741 | Transfer in from: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 17/07/1955 | 63674 | Transfer out to: | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 17/07/1955 | 63706 | Transfer out to: | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 23/07/1955 | 90115 | Transfer in from: | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 23/07/1955 | 90394 | Transfer in from: | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 23/07/1955 | 90418 | Transfer in from: | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 23/07/1955 | 90460 | Transfer in from: | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | on | 16/09/1955 | 68812 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | on | 23/09/1955 | 68807 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | on | 30/09/1955 | 68873 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | on | 19/10/1955 | 68787 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 22/10/1955 | 64438 | Transfer in from: | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | 5w/e | 22/10/1955 | 68759 | Transfer in from: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | 5w/e | 22/10/1955 | 68819 | Transfer in from: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 22/10/1955 | 64338 | Transfer out to: | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 23/10/1955 | 69800 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 23/10/1955 | 69804 | Transfer in from: | 40E | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 23/10/1955 | 69821 | Transfer in from: | 40E | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | on | 27/10/1955 | 64369 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 3w/e | 12/11/1955 | 64317 | Transfer in from: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | 3w/e | 12/11/1955 | 68785 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | 3w/e | 12/11/1955 | 68860 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | 3w/e | 12/11/1955 | 68975 | Transfer in from: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | N1 | 0-6-2T | 3w/e | 12/11/1955 | 69457 | Transfer out to: | 37A | Ardsley | ||
Steam | N1 | 0-6-2T | 3w/e | 12/11/1955 | 69469 | Transfer out to: | 37A | Ardsley | ||
Steam | N1 | 0-6-2T | 3w/e | 12/11/1955 | 69481 | Transfer out to: | 37A | Ardsley | ||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | on | 12/11/1955 | 68810 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | on | 18/11/1955 | 69310 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | on | 24/11/1955 | 68814 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | on | 25/11/1955 | 64194 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | on | 25/11/1955 | 68758 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | on | 09/12/1955 | 68765 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | on | 14/12/1955 | 64212 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | on | 16/12/1955 | 68858 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 17/12/1955 | 64221 | Transfer in from: | 34B | Hornsey | ||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 17/12/1955 | 64239 | Transfer in from: | HSY | Hornsey | ||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 17/12/1955 | 64248 | Transfer in from: | BOS | Boston | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 5w/e | 17/12/1955 | 68550 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 5w/e | 17/12/1955 | 68552 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 5w/e | 17/12/1955 | 68629 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 17/12/1955 | 90659 | Transfer in from: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 17/12/1955 | 64288 | Transfer out to: | 39A | Gorton | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 17/12/1955 | 64317 | Transfer out to: | 39A | Gorton | ||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 5w/e | 17/12/1955 | 69271 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 5w/e | 17/12/1955 | 69286 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 5w/e | 17/12/1955 | 69360 | Transfer out to: | 39A | Gorton | ||
Steam | J5 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/12/1955 | 65498 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J5 | 0-6-0 | on | 31/12/1955 | 65483 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | on | 31/12/1955 | 68852 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1956 | 63587 | Transfer in from: | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1956 | 63674 | Transfer in from: | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1956 | 63675 | Transfer in from: | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1956 | 63694 | Transfer in from: | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 21/01/1956 | 64267 | Transfer in from: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | 5w/e | 21/01/1956 | 68871 | Transfer in from: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | 5w/e | 21/01/1956 | 68875 | Transfer in from: | 37A | Ardsley | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 21/01/1956 | 90007 | Transfer out to: | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 21/01/1956 | 90276 | Transfer out to: | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 21/01/1956 | 90391 | Transfer out to: | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 21/01/1956 | 90418 | Transfer out to: | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 21/01/1956 | 90659 | Transfer out to: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 22/01/1956 | 63602 | Transfer out to: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 22/01/1956 | 63639 | Transfer out to: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 22/01/1956 | 63845 | Transfer out to: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 22/01/1956 | 63877 | Transfer out to: | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 29/01/1956 | 90064 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 29/01/1956 | 90066 | Transfer in from: | 36B | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 29/01/1956 | 63613 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 29/01/1956 | 63618 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 29/01/1956 | 63628 | Transfer out to: | 36B | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 29/01/1956 | 63673 | Transfer out to: | 36B | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 29/01/1956 | 63684 | Transfer out to: | 36B | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 29/01/1956 | 63723 | Transfer out to: | 36B | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 29/01/1956 | 63745 | Transfer out to: | 36B | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 29/01/1956 | 63751 | Transfer out to: | 36B | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 29/01/1956 | 63756 | Transfer out to: | 36B | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 29/01/1956 | 63781 | Transfer out to: | 36B | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 29/01/1956 | 63798 | Transfer out to: | 36B | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 29/01/1956 | 63812 | Transfer out to: | 36B | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 29/01/1956 | 63832 | Transfer out to: | 36B | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 29/01/1956 | 63835 | Transfer out to: | 36B | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 29/01/1956 | 63841 | Transfer out to: | 36B | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 29/01/1956 | 63851 | Transfer out to: | 36B | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 29/01/1956 | 63876 | Transfer out to: | 36B | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 29/01/1956 | 63891 | Transfer out to: | 36B | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 29/01/1956 | 63894 | Transfer out to: | 36B | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 29/01/1956 | 63908 | Transfer out to: | 36B | Mexborough | ||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/02/1956 | 64195 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 18/02/1956 | 67771 | Transfer in from: | 34E | Neasden | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 18/02/1956 | 68893 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 18/02/1956 | 68927 | Transfer in from: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 18/02/1956 | 90005 | Transfer in from: | 36B | Mexborough | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 18/02/1956 | 90015 | Transfer in from: | 36B | Mexborough | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 18/02/1956 | 90024 | Transfer in from: | 36B | Mexborough | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 18/02/1956 | 90037 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 18/02/1956 | 90053 | Transfer in from: | 36B | Mexborough | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 18/02/1956 | 90085 | Transfer in from: | 36B | Mexborough | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 18/02/1956 | 90104 | Transfer in from: | 36B | Mexborough | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 18/02/1956 | 90118 | Transfer in from: | 36B | Mexborough | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 18/02/1956 | 90119 | Transfer in from: | 36B | Mexborough | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 18/02/1956 | 90120 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 18/02/1956 | 90130 | Transfer in from: | 36B | Mexborough | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 18/02/1956 | 90144 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 18/02/1956 | 90146 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 18/02/1956 | 90150 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 18/02/1956 | 90153 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 18/02/1956 | 90161 | Transfer in from: | 86K | Abergavenny | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 18/02/1956 | 90166 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 18/02/1956 | 90189 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 18/02/1956 | 90244 | Transfer in from: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 18/02/1956 | 90528 | Transfer in from: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 18/02/1956 | 90674 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 18/02/1956 | 67769 | Transfer out to: | 34E | Neasden | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 18/02/1956 | 90208 | Transfer out to: | 38E | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 18/02/1956 | 90433 | Transfer out to: | 38E | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 18/02/1956 | 90491 | Transfer out to: | 38E | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 20/02/1956 | 61201 | Transfer in from: | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | on | 05/03/1956 | 68876 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | on | 14/03/1956 | 68821 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 24/03/1956 | 64256 | Transfer in from: | HSY | Hornsey | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 5w/e | 24/03/1956 | 67760 | Transfer in from: | NEA | Neasden | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 5w/e | 24/03/1956 | 68601 | Transfer in from: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 5w/e | 24/03/1956 | 68552 | Transfer out to: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | 5w/e | 24/03/1956 | 68875 | Transfer out to: | 34B | Hornsey | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 24/03/1956 | 90119 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 24/03/1956 | 90144 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 24/03/1956 | 90150 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 24/03/1956 | 90244 | Transfer out to: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 24/03/1956 | 90528 | Transfer out to: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 24/03/1956 | 90674 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 68877 | Transfer in from: | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 17/06/1956 | 63639 | Transfer in from: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 17/06/1956 | 61751 | Transfer out to: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | on | 18/06/1956 | 68819 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 09/07/1956 | 69828 | Transfer in from: | 40D | Tuxford | ||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | on | 19/07/1956 | 68759 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | m/e | 21/07/1956 | 68950 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 29/07/1956 | 69812 | Transfer in from: | 40F | Boston | ||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | on | 17/08/1956 | 68880 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 25/08/1956 | 68829 | Transfer in from: | 34A | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/09/1956 | 61873 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/09/1956 | 61888 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/09/1956 | 61947 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/09/1956 | 61975 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/09/1956 | 61982 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/09/1956 | 64338 | Transfer in from: | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 22/09/1956 | 68967 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/09/1956 | 64453 | Transfer out to: | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 07/10/1956 | 61066 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 07/10/1956 | 61111 | Transfer out to: | 34A | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 07/10/1956 | 69801 | Transfer out to: | 39A | Gorton | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 07/10/1956 | 69809 | Transfer out to: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 07/10/1956 | 69828 | Transfer out to: | 39A | Gorton | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 14/10/1956 | 61209 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 14/10/1956 | 69825 | Transfer out to: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 20/10/1956 | 67788 | Transfer in from: | 34E | Neasden | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 20/10/1956 | 67798 | Transfer in from: | 34E | Neasden | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 21/10/1956 | 61063 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 21/10/1956 | 69818 | Transfer out to: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 28/10/1956 | 61160 | Transfer in from: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 28/10/1956 | 61177 | Transfer in from: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 11/11/1956 | 61141 | Transfer in from: | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 11/11/1956 | 61185 | Transfer in from: | LEI | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 11/11/1956 | 63602 | Transfer in from: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 11/11/1956 | 61063 | Transfer out to: | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 11/11/1956 | 61269 | Transfer out to: | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 15/11/1956 | 61283 | Transfer out to: | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/11/1956 | 64345 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 17/11/1956 | 67751 | Transfer in from: | 34A | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/11/1956 | 64438 | Transfer out to: | 38E | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 17/11/1956 | 90085 | Transfer out to: | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 17/11/1956 | 90346 | Transfer out to: | 38E | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 18/11/1956 | 61088 | Transfer in from: | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | on | 20/11/1956 | 68877 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 09/12/1956 | 61283 | Transfer in from: | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 10/12/1956 | 61376 | Transfer out to: | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 15/12/1956 | 61975 | Transfer out to: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 19/01/1957 | 64388 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 19/01/1957 | 64438 | Transfer in from: | 38E | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 5w/e | 19/01/1957 | 67771 | Transfer out to: | 38E | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 10/02/1957 | 90066 | Transfer out to: | 38E | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 17/02/1957 | 61272 | Transfer out to: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 17/02/1957 | 69821 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 17/02/1957 | 69822 | Transfer out to: | 39A | Gorton | ||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | on | 11/03/1957 | 68826 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/03/1957 | 61804 | Transfer in from: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/03/1957 | 61838 | Transfer in from: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 16/03/1957 | 67786 | Transfer in from: | 34D | Hitchin (GNR) | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 10/04/1957 | 61732 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 20/04/1957 | 64361 | Transfer in from: | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 05/05/1957 | 61283 | Transfer out to: | 34A | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 05/05/1957 | 61367 | Transfer out to: | 34A | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | on | 06/05/1957 | 68851 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 07/05/1957 | 61726 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/05/1957 | 64354 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/05/1957 | 64420 | Transfer out to: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 19/05/1957 | 69805 | Transfer in from: | 39A | Gorton | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 19/05/1957 | 69828 | Transfer in from: | 39A | Gorton | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 02/06/1957 | 61739 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 02/06/1957 | 61749 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 15/06/1957 | 67751 | Transfer out to: | 39A | Gorton | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 15/06/1957 | 67798 | Transfer out to: | 39A | Gorton | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 15/06/1957 | 69800 | Transfer out to: | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 16/06/1957 | 61271 | Transfer out to: | 38E | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 25/06/1957 | 61729 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 61804 | Transfer out to: | 38E | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 61838 | Transfer out to: | 38E | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 18/08/1957 | 61777 | Transfer out to: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 24/08/1957 | 90001 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | on | 26/08/1957 | 68887 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/09/1957 | 61186 | Transfer out to: | 38E | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/09/1957 | 64364 | Transfer in from: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 21/09/1957 | 67786 | Transfer out to: | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 06/10/1957 | 61056 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 06/10/1957 | 61066 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 06/10/1957 | 61160 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/10/1957 | 64364 | Transfer out to: | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | on | 25/10/1957 | 68768 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 03/11/1957 | 63589 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 03/11/1957 | 63592 | Transfer in from: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 03/11/1957 | 63594 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 03/11/1957 | 63768 | Transfer in from: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 03/11/1957 | 63863 | Transfer in from: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 03/11/1957 | 64739 | Transfer out to: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 03/11/1957 | 64747 | Transfer out to: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 03/11/1957 | 64798 | Transfer out to: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 03/11/1957 | 64955 | Transfer out to: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/11/1957 | 64352 | Transfer in from: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/11/1957 | 64183 | Transfer out to: | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/11/1957 | 64256 | Transfer out to: | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 17/11/1957 | 61299 | Transfer in from: | LEI | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 08/12/1957 | 61106 | Transfer out to: | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/12/1957 | 61808 | Transfer in from: | 39A | Gorton | ||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | on | 23/12/1957 | 68860 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1958 | 64221 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | on | 06/01/1958 | 68785 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/01/1958 | 61837 | Transfer in from: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/01/1958 | 61852 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/01/1958 | 61809 | Transfer out to: | 38E | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/01/1958 | 61824 | Transfer out to: | 38E | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | on | 27/01/1958 | 64230 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | on | 27/01/1958 | 68882 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | on | 29/01/1958 | 64195 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/02/1958 | 64344 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/02/1958 | 64392 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 08/02/1958 | 68974 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/02/1958 | 64352 | Transfer out to: | 40D | Tuxford | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/02/1958 | 64354 | Transfer out to: | 40D | Tuxford | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/02/1958 | 64388 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | on | 10/02/1958 | 64200 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | on | 10/02/1958 | 68829 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | on | 10/02/1958 | 68871 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 08/03/1958 | 68033 | Transfer in from: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 08/03/1958 | 68554 | Transfer in from: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 16/03/1958 | 61771 | Transfer out to: | 40F | Boston | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 07/04/1958 | 69804 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | on | 21/04/1958 | 64199 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | on | 08/05/1958 | 68863 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/06/1958 | 61281 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/06/1958 | 61188 | Transfer out to: | 15E | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | on | 02/06/1958 | 64344 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 64218 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 14/07/1958 | 69807 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/07/1958 | 64218 | Transfer in from: | 40E | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 19/07/1958 | 68618 | Transfer in from: | 40F | Boston | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 19/07/1958 | 90139 | Transfer out to: | 41F | Mexborough | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 19/07/1958 | 90153 | Transfer out to: | 41F | Mexborough | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 19/07/1958 | 90384 | Transfer out to: | 41F | Mexborough | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 19/07/1958 | 90499 | Transfer out to: | 41F | Mexborough | ||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | on | 28/07/1958 | 64267 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 16/08/1958 | 68522 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | on | 18/08/1958 | 68618 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 07/09/1958 | 61188 | Transfer in from: | 15E | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 13/09/1958 | 90036 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 13/09/1958 | 90460 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 13/09/1958 | 90648 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | on | 18/09/1958 | 64218 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | on | 19/09/1958 | D3624 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | on | 25/09/1958 | 64202 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | on | 02/10/1958 | D3625 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | on | 06/10/1958 | D3626 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | on | 07/10/1958 | D3627 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/10/1958 | 63585 | Transfer in from: | 40E | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/10/1958 | 63829 | Transfer out to: | 41J | Langwith Junction | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | on | 16/10/1958 | D3628 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | on | 20/10/1958 | D3629 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | on | 20/10/1958 | 64338 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | on | 21/10/1958 | D3630 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 23/10/1958 | 69810 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 26/10/1958 | 61201 | Transfer out to: | 15E | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 09/11/1958 | 61763 | Transfer out to: | 40F | Boston | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 09/11/1958 | 61773 | Transfer out to: | 40F | Boston | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 09/11/1958 | 64716 | Transfer out to: | 40F | Boston | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 09/11/1958 | 64741 | Transfer out to: | 40F | Boston | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 09/11/1958 | 64823 | Transfer out to: | 40F | Boston | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 5w/e | 15/11/1958 | 67753 | Transfer in from: | 34E | Neasden | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 5w/e | 15/11/1958 | 67758 | Transfer in from: | 34E | Neasden | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 5w/e | 15/11/1958 | 67769 | Transfer in from: | 34E | Neasden | ||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | 5w/e | 15/11/1958 | 68033 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 26/11/1958 | 69828 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | on | 02/12/1958 | 64392 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 06/12/1958 | 67753 | Transfer in from: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 06/12/1958 | 67758 | Transfer in from: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 06/12/1958 | 67769 | Transfer in from: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 06/12/1958 | 67753 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 06/12/1958 | 67758 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 06/12/1958 | 67769 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/12/1958 | 63770 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 07/12/1958 | 64977 | Transfer in from: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | w/e | 13/12/1958 | 68028 | Transfer in from: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | w/e | 13/12/1958 | 68072 | Transfer in from: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | w/e | 13/12/1958 | 68076 | Transfer in from: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 13/12/1958 | 90263 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 14/12/1958 | 69809 | Transfer in from: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 14/12/1958 | 69825 | Transfer in from: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | on | 17/12/1958 | 64345 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 04/01/1959 | 64802 | Transfer in from: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 04/01/1959 | 64882 | Transfer in from: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 08/01/1959 | 64729 | Transfer in from: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 10/01/1959 | 64348 | Transfer in from: | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 11/01/1959 | 69800 | Transfer in from: | 15E | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 25/01/1959 | 64729 | Transfer out to: | 40F | Boston | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 26/01/1959 | 61768 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 27/01/1959 | 61749 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 31/01/1959 | 68545 | Transfer in from: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 21/02/1959 | 90015 | Transfer out to: | 34E | New England | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 21/02/1959 | 90269 | Transfer out to: | 34E | New England | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 27/02/1959 | 61739 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/03/1959 | 64712 | Transfer in from: | 40F | Boston | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/03/1959 | 64887 | Transfer in from: | 40F | Boston | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/03/1959 | 64827 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/03/1959 | 64882 | Transfer out to: | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | ||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | on | 04/03/1959 | 64248 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/03/1959 | 63638 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 21/03/1959 | 43154 | Transfer in from: | 40F | Boston | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 21/03/1959 | 43155 | Transfer in from: | 40F | Boston | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 21/03/1959 | 43158 | Transfer in from: | 40F | Boston | ||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | on | 24/03/1959 | 64215 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | on | 25/03/1959 | 64361 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 31/03/1959 | 63729 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 03/04/1959 | 63839 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 28/04/1959 | 63614 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 04/05/1959 | 69809 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 06/05/1959 | 64715 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 09/05/1959 | 90052 | Transfer out to: | 41G | Barnsley | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 09/05/1959 | 90064 | Transfer out to: | 41G | Barnsley | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 09/05/1959 | 90519 | Transfer out to: | 41G | Barnsley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 08/06/1959 | 63699 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | on | 16/06/1959 | 68967 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 67741 | Transfer in from: | HIT | Hitchin (GNR) | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 67790 | Transfer in from: | 34D | Hitchin (GNR) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 21/06/1959 | 63602 | Transfer out to: | 36C | Frodingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 21/06/1959 | 63647 | Transfer out to: | 36C | Frodingham | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 27/06/1959 | 61808 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 29/06/1959 | 64762 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 29/06/1959 | 64763 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 03/07/1959 | 61738 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 07/07/1959 | 69812 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 01/08/1959 | 43060 | Transfer in from: | 40F | Boston | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 01/08/1959 | 43108 | Transfer in from: | 40F | Boston | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 01/08/1959 | 43111 | Transfer in from: | 40F | Boston | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 01/08/1959 | 43159 | Transfer in from: | 40F | Boston | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 01/08/1959 | 61808 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 03/08/1959 | 64735 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | on | 03/08/1959 | 68974 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 09/08/1959 | 63819 | Transfer in from: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 15/08/1959 | 90263 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 15/08/1959 | 90648 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 24/08/1959 | 69800 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/09/1959 | 90051 | Transfer in from: | 41D | Canklow | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 23/09/1959 | 69805 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 26/09/1959 | D3629 | Transfer out to: | 34E | New England | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 26/09/1959 | D3630 | Transfer out to: | 34E | New England | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 28/09/1959 | 61753 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 28/09/1959 | 64832 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/10/1959 | 68601 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | on | 05/10/1959 | 68893 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 17/10/1959 | 68554 | Transfer out to: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 21/10/1959 | 61780 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 30/10/1959 | 63694 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | on | 31/10/1959 | 64239 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | on | 31/10/1959 | 64269 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 04/11/1959 | 61723 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 43159 | Transfer out to: | 41B | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 08/11/1959 | 64823 | Transfer in from: | 40F | Boston | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 08/11/1959 | 64889 | Transfer in from: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 10/11/1959 | 64983 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 14/11/1959 | 43060 | Transfer out to: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 14/11/1959 | 43111 | Transfer out to: | 41B | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 14/11/1959 | 43154 | Transfer out to: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 14/11/1959 | 43158 | Transfer out to: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 14/11/1959 | 68522 | Transfer out to: | 40F | Boston | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 25/11/1959 | 64976 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | on | 26/11/1959 | 68629 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 30/11/1959 | 69825 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 06/12/1959 | 61142 | Transfer in from: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 06/12/1959 | 61185 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 11/12/1959 | 61752 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 12/12/1959 | 61907 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 12/12/1959 | 61943 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/12/1959 | 90073 | Transfer out to: | 34E | New England | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/12/1959 | 90154 | Transfer out to: | 34E | New England | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 30/12/1959 | 61754 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/12/1959 | 64980 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/12/1959 | 64988 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | on | 11/01/1960 | 64438 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 20/01/1960 | 64887 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 04/02/1960 | 64712 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 04/02/1960 | 64977 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 13/02/1960 | 43156 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 13/02/1960 | 67707 | Transfer in from: | 32C | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | on | 18/02/1960 | 64213 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 20/02/1960 | 43148 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | w/e | 20/02/1960 | 68009 | Transfer in from: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 20/02/1960 | 68950 | Transfer out to: | 34B | Hornsey | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 20/02/1960 | 90024 | Transfer out to: | 34E | New England | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 20/02/1960 | 90050 | Transfer out to: | 34E | New England | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 20/02/1960 | 90075 | Transfer out to: | 34E | New England | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 20/02/1960 | 90189 | Transfer out to: | 36C | Frodingham | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 20/02/1960 | 90202 | Transfer out to: | 41D | Canklow | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 27/02/1960 | 43152 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 27/02/1960 | 67727 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | w/e | 27/02/1960 | 68033 | Transfer in from: | 34B | Hornsey | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 27/02/1960 | 68570 | Transfer in from: | 40F | Boston | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 27/02/1960 | 68550 | Transfer out to: | 40F | Boston | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 05/03/1960 | 43151 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 05/03/1960 | 67710 | Transfer in from: | 34A | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | on | 11/03/1960 | 64348 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 12/03/1960 | 67775 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 13/03/1960 | 64736 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 13/03/1960 | 64746 | Transfer in from: | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 13/03/1960 | 64804 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 19/03/1960 | 64219 | Transfer in from: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 19/03/1960 | 43151 | Transfer out to: | 34E | New England | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 19/03/1960 | 64397 | Transfer out to: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 20/03/1960 | 61160 | Transfer in from: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 27/03/1960 | 61160 | Transfer out to: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 10/04/1960 | 63616 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 10/04/1960 | 63644 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 10/04/1960 | 63750 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 10/04/1960 | 63860 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 10/04/1960 | 63900 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 16/04/1960 | 90053 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 16/04/1960 | 90161 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 16/04/1960 | 90166 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 16/04/1960 | 90288 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 16/04/1960 | 90394 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 07/05/1960 | 68626 | Transfer in from: | 34F | Grantham | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 07/05/1960 | 68635 | Transfer in from: | 34F | Grantham | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 07/05/1960 | 90259 | Transfer in from: | 40E | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 07/05/1960 | 90287 | Transfer in from: | 40E | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 07/05/1960 | 90438 | Transfer in from: | 40E | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 07/05/1960 | 90492 | Transfer in from: | 40E | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 07/05/1960 | 90545 | Transfer in from: | 40E | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 07/05/1960 | 90554 | Transfer in from: | 40E | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 07/05/1960 | 90577 | Transfer in from: | 40E | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 07/05/1960 | 90594 | Transfer in from: | 40E | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 07/05/1960 | 90130 | Transfer out to: | 34E | New England | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 07/05/1960 | 90146 | Transfer out to: | 34E | New England | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 07/05/1960 | 90185 | Transfer out to: | 34E | New England | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 07/05/1960 | 90215 | Transfer out to: | 34E | New England | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 07/05/1960 | 90618 | Transfer out to: | 34E | New England | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 07/05/1960 | 90703 | Transfer out to: | 34E | New England | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 07/05/1960 | 90717 | Transfer out to: | 34E | New England | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 12/06/1960 | 61000 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 12/06/1960 | 61247 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 12/06/1960 | 61285 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 12/06/1960 | 61390 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 12/06/1960 | 61740 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 12/06/1960 | 61756 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 12/06/1960 | 61766 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 12/06/1960 | 61767 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 68558 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 19/06/1960 | 69814 | Transfer in from: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 25/07/1960 | 64802 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 06/08/1960 | 61914 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 13/08/1960 | 90288 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 13/08/1960 | 90648 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | w/e | 20/08/1960 | 68070 | Transfer in from: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | w/e | 20/08/1960 | 68074 | Transfer in from: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 20/08/1960 | 64889 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 31/08/1960 | 64974 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | on | 02/09/1960 | 68076 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 04/09/1960 | 61771 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 04/09/1960 | 61773 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | on | 07/09/1960 | 68028 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | on | 07/09/1960 | 68072 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 15/10/1960 | 90288 | Transfer out to: | 36C | Frodingham | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 16/10/1960 | 61175 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 22/10/1960 | 61889 | Transfer in from: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 22/10/1960 | 61894 | Transfer in from: | LIN | Lincoln | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 22/10/1960 | 90036 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 22/10/1960 | 90383 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 22/10/1960 | 90393 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 22/10/1960 | 90510 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 22/10/1960 | 90674 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 22/10/1960 | 90025 | Transfer out to: | 36C | Frodingham | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 22/10/1960 | 90115 | Transfer out to: | 36C | Frodingham | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 22/10/1960 | 90120 | Transfer out to: | 36C | Frodingham | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 22/10/1960 | 90235 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 22/10/1960 | 90296 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 22/10/1960 | 90476 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 22/10/1960 | 90496 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | on | 23/10/1960 | D2301 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | on | 25/10/1960 | 68033 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 29/10/1960 | 67719 | Transfer in from: | 34A | Kings Cross | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 12/11/1960 | D3442 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 14/11/1960 | 69814 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 27/11/1960 | 61227 | Transfer in from: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 27/11/1960 | 61264 | Transfer in from: | PKS | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 27/11/1960 | 61336 | Transfer in from: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 27/11/1960 | 61361 | Transfer in from: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 03/12/1960 | 90577 | Transfer out to: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 16/12/1960 | 61771 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 17/12/1960 | 61810 | Transfer in from: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 17/12/1960 | 61827 | Transfer in from: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 17/12/1960 | 61831 | Transfer in from: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 17/12/1960 | 61835 | Transfer in from: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 17/12/1960 | 61939 | Transfer in from: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 17/12/1960 | 61949 | Transfer in from: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 17/12/1960 | 61951 | Transfer in from: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 17/12/1960 | 61953 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 17/12/1960 | 61957 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 17/12/1960 | 61977 | Transfer in from: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 23/12/1960 | 61773 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 24/12/1960 | 61845 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 24/12/1960 | 61860 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 24/12/1960 | 61950 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 24/12/1960 | 61974 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 03/01/1961 | 61740 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 05/01/1961 | 64823 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 06/01/1961 | 61767 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 07/01/1961 | 61970 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 07/01/1961 | 61971 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 07/01/1961 | 67743 | Transfer in from: | 9G | Gorton | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 07/01/1961 | 67747 | Transfer in from: | 9G | Gorton | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 07/01/1961 | 67748 | Transfer in from: | 9G | Gorton | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 07/01/1961 | 67751 | Transfer in from: | 39A | Gorton | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 07/01/1961 | 67756 | Transfer in from: | 9G | Gorton | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 07/01/1961 | 67762 | Transfer in from: | 9G | Gorton | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 07/01/1961 | 67707 | Transfer out to: | 9G | Gorton | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 07/01/1961 | 67710 | Transfer out to: | 9G | Gorton | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 07/01/1961 | 67719 | Transfer out to: | 9G | Gorton | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 07/01/1961 | 67727 | Transfer out to: | 9G | Gorton | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | on | 13/01/1961 | 68558 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 14/01/1961 | 61861 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 14/01/1961 | 61972 | Transfer in from: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 23/01/1961 | 61766 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 28/01/1961 | 43108 | Transfer out to: | 40F | Boston | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 28/01/1961 | 43148 | Transfer out to: | 40F | Boston | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 29/01/1961 | 61756 | Transfer out to: | 34A | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | on | 03/02/1961 | 68545 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | on | 13/02/1961 | 67790 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 20/02/1961 | 64746 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 04/03/1961 | 67746 | Transfer in from: | 34A | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 20/03/1961 | 61971 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 01/04/1961 | 61845 | Transfer out to: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | w/e | 15/04/1961 | 68018 | Transfer in from: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | on | 17/04/1961 | 68927 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 19/04/1961 | 64804 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/04/1961 | D3442 | Transfer out to: | 40F | Boston | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 17/06/1961 | D2024 | Transfer in from: | 40F | Boston | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 17/06/1961 | D2300 | Transfer in from: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 68018 | Transfer out to: | 40F | Boston | ||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 68070 | Transfer out to: | 40F | Boston | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 68570 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 68626 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 68635 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 10/07/1961 | 64736 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 15/07/1961 | 61966 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 15/07/1961 | 61950 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 15/07/1961 | 68975 | Transfer out to: | 34A | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 18/07/1961 | 61852 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 19/08/1961 | 61951 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 19/08/1961 | 61970 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 19/08/1961 | 61972 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | on | 28/08/1961 | 67760 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | m/e | 09/1961 | 67769 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/09/1961 | D2302 | Transfer in from: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 43032 | Transfer in from: | 19B | Sheffield Millhouses | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 43160 | Transfer in from: | 41B | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 43161 | Transfer in from: | 41B | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 20/09/1961 | 61833 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | on | 20/09/1961 | 67775 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | on | 22/09/1961 | 67758 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 23/09/1961 | 61914 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 23/09/1961 | 61810 | Transfer out to: | 34E | New England | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 23/09/1961 | 61835 | Transfer out to: | 34E | New England | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 23/09/1961 | 61861 | Transfer out to: | 34E | New England | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 23/09/1961 | 61949 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 23/09/1961 | 61953 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 25/09/1961 | 61808 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 25/09/1961 | 61888 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 30/09/1961 | 67749 | Transfer in from: | 34A | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 30/09/1961 | 67783 | Transfer in from: | 34A | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 05/10/1961 | 63860 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 28/10/1961 | 68982 | Transfer in from: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 30/10/1961 | 61894 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | on | 30/10/1961 | 67762 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 04/11/1961 | 61877 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 11/11/1961 | 67744 | Transfer in from: | 34A | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 11/11/1961 | 67745 | Transfer in from: | 34A | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | on | 13/11/1961 | 64219 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | on | 15/11/1961 | 67748 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 16/11/1961 | 61860 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 25/11/1961 | 67767 | Transfer in from: | 34A | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 25/11/1961 | 67792 | Transfer in from: | 34A | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 13/01/1962 | 67780 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 13/01/1962 | 67784 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 13/01/1962 | 67787 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 20/01/1962 | 61905 | Transfer in from: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 20/01/1962 | 61944 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 20/01/1962 | 61889 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 20/01/1962 | 61939 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | on | 06/02/1962 | 67753 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 19/02/1962 | 61966 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | on | 20/02/1962 | 67743 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 05/03/1962 | 61000 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | on | 29/03/1962 | 67751 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | on | 29/03/1962 | 67756 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | on | 29/03/1962 | 67799 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 14/04/1962 | 67770 | Transfer in from: | 34A | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 14/04/1962 | 67786 | Transfer in from: | 34A | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 14/04/1962 | 67800 | Transfer in from: | 34A | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 27/04/1962 | 61837 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 08/05/1962 | 61873 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 12/05/1962 | 67779 | Transfer in from: | 34A | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 12/05/1962 | 67793 | Transfer in from: | 34A | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 12/05/1962 | 67797 | Transfer in from: | 34A | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 14/05/1962 | 61896 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | on | 30/05/1962 | 67788 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 09/06/1962 | 61811 | Transfer in from: | 41J | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 09/06/1962 | 61820 | Transfer in from: | 41D | Canklow | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 09/06/1962 | 61822 | Transfer in from: | 41D | Canklow | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 09/06/1962 | 61826 | Transfer in from: | 41H | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 09/06/1962 | 61973 | Transfer in from: | 41H | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 09/06/1962 | 61981 | Transfer in from: | 41F | Mexborough | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 12/06/1962 | 61247 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | w/e | 16/06/1962 | 68067 | Transfer in from: | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | ||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | w/e | 16/06/1962 | 68075 | Transfer in from: | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 16/06/1962 | 68982 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 67798 | Transfer in from: | 34F | Grantham | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 90169 | Transfer in from: | 87G | Carmarthen | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 90304 | Transfer in from: | 34E | New England | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 90703 | Transfer in from: | 34E | New England | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 90717 | Transfer in from: | 34E | New England | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 61811 | Transfer out to: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 61820 | Transfer out to: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 61822 | Transfer out to: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 61973 | Transfer out to: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 61981 | Transfer out to: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | w/e | 30/06/1962 | 68018 | Transfer in from: | 40F | Boston | ||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | w/e | 30/06/1962 | 68070 | Transfer in from: | 40F | Boston | ||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | w/e | 30/06/1962 | 68077 | Transfer in from: | 40F | Boston | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/07/1962 | 61160 | Transfer in from: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 07/07/1962 | 61905 | Transfer out to: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | on | 09/07/1962 | 67747 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 12/07/1962 | 61870 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 24/07/1962 | 61877 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | on | 31/07/1962 | 67746 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 01/08/1962 | 61947 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | w/e | 04/08/1962 | 68009 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | w/e | 04/08/1962 | 68018 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 23/08/1962 | 61914 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 25/08/1962 | D2235 | Transfer in from: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | m/e | 09/1962 | 61943 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 16/09/1962 | 61163 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 16/09/1962 | 61209 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 16/09/1962 | 61821 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 16/09/1962 | 61826 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 16/09/1962 | 61827 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 16/09/1962 | 61831 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 16/09/1962 | 61907 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 16/09/1962 | 61944 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 16/09/1962 | 61957 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 16/09/1962 | 61977 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 16/09/1962 | 61982 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 16/09/1962 | 90473 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 16/09/1962 | 90554 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 16/09/1962 | 90594 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | on | 21/09/1962 | 67793 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/09/1962 | 63607 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/09/1962 | 63615 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/09/1962 | 63651 | Transfer in from: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/09/1962 | 63692 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/09/1962 | 63707 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/09/1962 | 63738 | Transfer in from: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/09/1962 | 63837 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/09/1962 | 63878 | Transfer in from: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/09/1962 | 63587 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/09/1962 | 63616 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/09/1962 | 63657 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/09/1962 | 63900 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 29/09/1962 | 43060 | Transfer in from: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 29/09/1962 | 43145 | Transfer in from: | 41H | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 29/09/1962 | 43154 | Transfer in from: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/10/1962 | 63652 | Transfer in from: | 41H | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/10/1962 | 63663 | Transfer in from: | 41H | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | on | 17/10/1962 | 67797 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | on | 17/10/1962 | 68074 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | on | 08/11/1962 | 67784 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 09/12/1962 | 63738 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | w/e | 15/12/1962 | 68070 | Transfer out to: | 41F | Mexborough | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | on | 19/12/1962 | 67783 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 29/12/1962 | 63837 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | on | 29/12/1962 | 67741 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | on | 29/12/1962 | 67744 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | on | 29/12/1962 | 67745 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | on | 29/12/1962 | 67749 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | on | 29/12/1962 | 67767 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | on | 29/12/1962 | 67770 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | on | 29/12/1962 | 67779 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | on | 29/12/1962 | 67780 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | on | 29/12/1962 | 67786 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | on | 29/12/1962 | 67787 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | on | 29/12/1962 | 67792 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | on | 29/12/1962 | 67798 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | on | 29/12/1962 | 67800 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | on | 29/12/1962 | 68075 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | on | 29/12/1962 | 68077 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 29/12/1962 | 90287 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 29/12/1962 | 90303 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 30/12/1962 | 63585 | Transfer out to: | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 30/12/1962 | 63607 | Transfer out to: | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 30/12/1962 | 63651 | Transfer out to: | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 30/12/1962 | 63692 | Transfer out to: | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 30/12/1962 | 63878 | Transfer out to: | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 05/01/1963 | 43059 | Transfer in from: | 40F | Boston | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 05/01/1963 | 43061 | Transfer in from: | 40F | Boston | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 05/01/1963 | 43062 | Transfer in from: | 40F | Boston | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 05/01/1963 | 43064 | Transfer in from: | 40F | Boston | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 05/01/1963 | 43065 | Transfer in from: | 40F | Boston | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 05/01/1963 | 43066 | Transfer in from: | 40F | Boston | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 05/01/1963 | 43080 | Transfer in from: | 40F | Boston | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 05/01/1963 | 43108 | Transfer in from: | 40F | Boston | ||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | w/e | 10/02/1963 | 68067 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 24/02/1963 | 63594 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 09/03/1963 | 43161 | Transfer out to: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 09/06/1963 | 63589 | Transfer out to: | 41H | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 09/06/1963 | 63592 | Transfer out to: | 41H | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 09/06/1963 | 63652 | Transfer out to: | 41H | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 09/06/1963 | 63663 | Transfer out to: | 41H | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 09/06/1963 | 63768 | Transfer out to: | 41H | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 09/06/1963 | 63863 | Transfer out to: | 41H | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 15/06/1963 | 92040 | Transfer in from: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 15/06/1963 | 92041 | Transfer in from: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 15/06/1963 | 92042 | Transfer in from: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 15/06/1963 | 92183 | Transfer in from: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 15/06/1963 | 92184 | Transfer in from: | 34E | New England | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 15/06/1963 | 92185 | Transfer in from: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 15/06/1963 | 92186 | Transfer in from: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 15/06/1963 | 92187 | Transfer in from: | 34E | New England | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 15/06/1963 | 92188 | Transfer in from: | 34E | New England | ||
Diesel | D2/5 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | D2403 | Transfer in from: | 40F | Boston | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 92036 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 92039 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 92044 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 92148 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | D2235 | Transfer out to: | 34D | Hitchin (GNR) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 92189 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 92190 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 92191 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 92192 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 92198 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 92199 | Transfer in from: | 36C | Frodingham | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 22/09/1963 | 61097 | Transfer in from: | 34E | New England | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 22/09/1963 | 61210 | Transfer in from: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 22/09/1963 | 63615 | Transfer out to: | 41J | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 22/09/1963 | 61088 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 22/09/1963 | 61142 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 22/09/1963 | 61160 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 22/09/1963 | 61177 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 22/09/1963 | 61227 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 22/09/1963 | 61336 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 28/09/1963 | 43062 | Transfer out to: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 28/09/1963 | 90005 | Transfer out to: | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 28/09/1963 | 90169 | Transfer out to: | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 28/09/1963 | 90717 | Transfer out to: | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/10/1963 | 63859 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 19/10/1963 | D2207 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 19/10/1963 | D2298 | Transfer in from: | 40F | Boston | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 19/10/1963 | D3624 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 09/11/1963 | D2235 | Transfer in from: | 40F | Boston | ||
Diesel | D2/5 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 09/11/1963 | D2403 | Transfer out to: | 40F | Boston | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 09/11/1963 | 92036 | Transfer out to: | 34E | New England | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 09/11/1963 | 92184 | Transfer out to: | 34E | New England | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 09/11/1963 | 92185 | Transfer out to: | 34E | New England | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 24/11/1963 | 61097 | Transfer out to: | 34E | New England | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 25/11/1963 | 90118 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 30/11/1963 | 92039 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 30/11/1963 | 92192 | Transfer out to: | 36C | Frodingham | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 30/11/1963 | 92198 | Transfer out to: | 36C | Frodingham | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 30/11/1963 | 92199 | Transfer out to: | 36C | Frodingham | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 28/12/1963 | 61175 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 28/12/1963 | 90604 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | on | 05/01/1964 | 43061 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | on | 05/01/1964 | 43152 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 05/01/1964 | 90263 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 11/01/1964 | D2023 | Transfer in from: | 40F | Boston | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 11/01/1964 | D2025 | Transfer in from: | 40F | Boston | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 11/01/1964 | D2027 | Transfer in from: | 40F | Boston | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 11/01/1964 | D2241 | Transfer in from: | 40F | Boston | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 11/01/1964 | D2296 | Transfer in from: | 40F | Boston | ||
Diesel | D2/5 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 11/01/1964 | D2401 | Transfer in from: | 40F | Boston | ||
Diesel | D2/5 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 11/01/1964 | D2402 | Transfer in from: | 40F | Boston | ||
Diesel | D2/5 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 11/01/1964 | D2403 | Transfer in from: | 40F | Boston | ||
Diesel | D2/5 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 11/01/1964 | D2407 | Transfer in from: | 40F | Boston | ||
Diesel | D2/5 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 11/01/1964 | D2409 | Transfer in from: | 40F | Boston | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 11/01/1964 | D3442 | Transfer in from: | 40F | Boston | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 11/01/1964 | D3489 | Transfer in from: | 40F | Boston | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 11/01/1964 | D3490 | Transfer in from: | 40F | Boston | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 11/01/1964 | D4086 | Transfer in from: | 40F | Boston | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 11/01/1964 | 43058 | Transfer in from: | 40F | Boston | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 11/01/1964 | 43091 | Transfer in from: | 40F | Boston | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 11/01/1964 | 43093 | Transfer in from: | 40F | Boston | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 11/01/1964 | 43149 | Transfer in from: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 11/01/1964 | 92036 | Transfer in from: | 34E | New England | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 11/01/1964 | 43108 | Transfer out to: | 34E | New England | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/02/1964 | 63754 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 09/03/1964 | 63750 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 43059 | Transfer out to: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 92036 | Transfer out to: | 34E | New England | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 92190 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 15/08/1964 | D2207 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/08/1964 | D2018 | Transfer in from: | 34D | Hitchin (GNR) | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/08/1964 | D2019 | Transfer in from: | 34D | Hitchin (GNR) | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 24/08/1964 | D2235 | Transfer out to: | 86C | Hereford | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/09/1964 | 90304 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/09/1964 | 90282 | Transfer in from: | 27B | Aintree | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/09/1964 | 90316 | Transfer in from: | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/09/1964 | 90413 | Transfer in from: | 8L | Aintree | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/09/1964 | 90423 | Transfer in from: | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/09/1964 | 90466 | Transfer in from: | 26C | Bolton | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/09/1964 | 90606 | Transfer in from: | 8G | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 12/09/1964 | 92040 | Transfer out to: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 12/09/1964 | 92041 | Transfer out to: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 12/09/1964 | 92044 | Transfer out to: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 12/09/1964 | 92148 | Transfer out to: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 10/10/1964 | 43066 | Transfer out to: | 10A | Carnforth | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 31/10/1964 | 43064 | Transfer out to: | 41D | Canklow | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 31/10/1964 | 43091 | Transfer out to: | 41D | Canklow | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 31/10/1964 | 43093 | Transfer out to: | 41D | Canklow | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 31/10/1964 | 43149 | Transfer out to: | 41D | Canklow | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | on | 26/12/1964 | 43058 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | on | 26/12/1964 | 43060 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | on | 26/12/1964 | 43154 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 03/01/1965 | 61070 | Transfer in from: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 03/01/1965 | 61194 | Transfer in from: | 34E | New England | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 03/01/1965 | 61302 | Transfer in from: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 10/01/1965 | 61248 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | on | 10/01/1965 | 43032 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | on | 10/01/1965 | 43065 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | on | 10/01/1965 | 43145 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | on | 10/01/1965 | 43155 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | on | 10/01/1965 | 43156 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | on | 10/01/1965 | 43160 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 10/01/1965 | 90282 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 16/01/1965 | 43080 | Transfer out to: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 16/01/1965 | 90383 | Transfer out to: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 16/01/1965 | 92042 | Transfer out to: | 41J | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 16/01/1965 | 92183 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 16/01/1965 | 92186 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 16/01/1965 | 92189 | Transfer out to: | 41J | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 16/01/1965 | 92191 | Transfer out to: | 41J | Langwith Junction | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 23/01/1965 | D5296 | Transfer in from: | 16D | Nottingham | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | m/e | 02/1965 | 92188 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 21/02/1965 | 92187 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 28/03/1965 | 61145 | Transfer in from: | 41D | Canklow | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 01/05/1965 | D7578 | Transfer in from: | 16C | Derby | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 01/05/1965 | D5296 | Transfer out to: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 22/05/1965 | D5195 | Transfer in from: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 22/05/1965 | D7578 | Transfer out to: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/06/1965 | 90080 | Transfer in from: | 10F | Rose Grove | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/06/1965 | 90187 | Transfer in from: | 10H | Lower Darwen | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/06/1965 | 90241 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 13/06/1965 | 61094 | Transfer in from: | 41D | Canklow | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 13/06/1965 | 61190 | Transfer in from: | 41D | Canklow | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 13/06/1965 | 61392 | Transfer in from: | 41D | Canklow | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 13/06/1965 | 63607 | Transfer in from: | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 19/06/1965 | D4088 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 90130 | Transfer in from: | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 90514 | Transfer in from: | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 90528 | Transfer in from: | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 90533 | Transfer in from: | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 20/06/1965 | 61094 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 20/06/1965 | 61190 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 20/06/1965 | 61392 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 04/07/1965 | 90510 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 11/07/1965 | 61089 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 11/07/1965 | 63707 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 11/07/1965 | 90703 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | D2/5 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 17/07/1965 | D2401 | Transfer out to: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Diesel | D2/5 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 17/07/1965 | D2402 | Transfer out to: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 24/07/1965 | 90665 | Transfer in from: | 36C | Frodingham | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 24/07/1965 | 90669 | Transfer in from: | 36C | Frodingham | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 24/07/1965 | 90689 | Transfer in from: | 36C | Frodingham | ||
Diesel | D2/5 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 24/07/1965 | D2403 | Transfer out to: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Diesel | D2/5 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 24/07/1965 | D2407 | Transfer out to: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Diesel | D2/5 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 24/07/1965 | D2409 | Transfer out to: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 25/07/1965 | 61141 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 25/07/1965 | 61299 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 01/08/1965 | 63781 | Transfer in from: | 36C | Frodingham | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 01/08/1965 | 90038 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 01/08/1965 | 90674 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 22/08/1965 | 61070 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 22/08/1965 | 90393 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 29/08/1965 | 63858 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 29/08/1965 | 61194 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 05/09/1965 | 63607 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 26/09/1965 | 61003 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 26/09/1965 | 61026 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 26/09/1965 | 61042 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 26/09/1965 | 90528 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 03/10/1965 | 90051 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 03/10/1965 | 90259 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 03/10/1965 | 90432 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 03/10/1965 | 90438 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 03/10/1965 | 90545 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 09/10/1965 | 90001 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 09/10/1965 | 90148 | Transfer in from: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 09/10/1965 | 90190 | Transfer in from: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 09/10/1965 | 90295 | Transfer in from: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 09/10/1965 | 90346 | Transfer in from: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 09/10/1965 | 90367 | Transfer in from: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 09/10/1965 | 90384 | Transfer in from: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 09/10/1965 | 90410 | Transfer in from: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 09/10/1965 | 90471 | Transfer in from: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 09/10/1965 | 90706 | Transfer in from: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 17/10/1965 | 90130 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 17/10/1965 | 90492 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 24/10/1965 | 90346 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 06/11/1965 | 92042 | Transfer in from: | 41J | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 06/11/1965 | 92141 | Transfer in from: | 41J | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 06/11/1965 | 92144 | Transfer in from: | 41J | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 06/11/1965 | 92145 | Transfer in from: | 41J | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 06/11/1965 | 92146 | Transfer in from: | 41J | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 06/11/1965 | 92148 | Transfer in from: | 41J | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 06/11/1965 | 92173 | Transfer in from: | 41J | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 06/11/1965 | 92179 | Transfer in from: | 41J | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 06/11/1965 | 92182 | Transfer in from: | 41J | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 06/11/1965 | 92189 | Transfer in from: | 41J | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 06/11/1965 | 92191 | Transfer in from: | 41J | Langwith Junction | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 06/11/1965 | D2241 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 06/11/1965 | D2296 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 07/11/1965 | 61248 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 07/11/1965 | 63819 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 13/11/1965 | D4064 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 13/11/1965 | D2298 | Transfer out to: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 13/11/1965 | 90001 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 13/11/1965 | 90410 | Transfer out to: | 36C | Frodingham | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 13/11/1965 | 90471 | Transfer out to: | 36C | Frodingham | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 14/11/1965 | 61348 | Transfer in from: | 36C | Frodingham | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 14/11/1965 | 61188 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 14/11/1965 | 92179 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 21/11/1965 | 61264 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 21/11/1965 | 90103 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 28/11/1965 | 61042 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 28/11/1965 | 61210 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Diesel | D3/5 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 11/12/1965 | D3165 | Transfer in from: | 91M | To London Midland Region | ||
Diesel | D3/5 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 11/12/1965 | D3166 | Transfer in from: | 91M | To London Midland Region | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 18/12/1965 | 44847 | Transfer in from: | 16E | Kirkby in Ashfield | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 18/12/1965 | 45267 | Transfer in from: | 16B | Annesley | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 18/12/1965 | 45406 | Transfer in from: | 16E | Kirkby in Ashfield | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 18/12/1965 | 48060 | Transfer in from: | 16G | Westhouses | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 18/12/1965 | 48107 | Transfer in from: | 15A | Leicester Midland | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 18/12/1965 | 48180 | Transfer in from: | 15A | Leicester Midland | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 18/12/1965 | 48197 | Transfer in from: | 18B | Westhouses | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 18/12/1965 | 48212 | Transfer in from: | 15A | Leicester Midland | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 18/12/1965 | 48258 | Transfer in from: | 16G | Westhouses | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 18/12/1965 | 48380 | Transfer in from: | 15A | Leicester Midland | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 18/12/1965 | 48393 | Transfer in from: | 16G | Westhouses | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 18/12/1965 | 48414 | Transfer in from: | 15A | Leicester Midland | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 18/12/1965 | 48507 | Transfer in from: | 18B | Westhouses | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 18/12/1965 | 48645 | Transfer in from: | 15A | Leicester Midland | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 18/12/1965 | 48750 | Transfer in from: | 18B | Westhouses | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 19/12/1965 | 61026 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 19/12/1965 | 61285 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 19/12/1965 | 63639 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 19/12/1965 | 63770 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 19/12/1965 | 90036 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 19/12/1965 | 90665 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 19/12/1965 | 92042 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 19/12/1965 | 92141 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 19/12/1965 | 92144 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 19/12/1965 | 92148 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 19/12/1965 | 92189 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 19/12/1965 | 92191 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 25/12/1965 | 44659 | Transfer in from: | 16C | Derby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 25/12/1965 | 44665 | Transfer in from: | 16E | Kirkby in Ashfield | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 25/12/1965 | 44811 | Transfer in from: | 16C | Derby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 25/12/1965 | 44825 | Transfer in from: | 17B | Burton | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 25/12/1965 | 44830 | Transfer in from: | 16C | Derby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 25/12/1965 | 44835 | Transfer in from: | 16E | Kirkby in Ashfield | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 25/12/1965 | 44839 | Transfer in from: | 17B | Burton | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 25/12/1965 | 44920 | Transfer in from: | 16C | Derby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 25/12/1965 | 44941 | Transfer in from: | 17B | Burton | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 25/12/1965 | 45190 | Transfer in from: | 16E | Kirkby in Ashfield | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 25/12/1965 | 45333 | Transfer in from: | 16E | Kirkby in Ashfield | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 25/12/1965 | 45464 | Transfer in from: | 16F | Burton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 25/12/1965 | 48000 | Transfer in from: | 16C | Derby | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 25/12/1965 | 48132 | Transfer in from: | 15A | Leicester Midland | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 25/12/1965 | 48137 | Transfer in from: | 15A | Leicester Midland | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 25/12/1965 | 48142 | Transfer in from: | 16A | Toton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 25/12/1965 | 48167 | Transfer in from: | 16A | Toton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 25/12/1965 | 48170 | Transfer in from: | 16C | Derby | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 25/12/1965 | 48192 | Transfer in from: | 16B | Kirkby in Ashfield | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 25/12/1965 | 48193 | Transfer in from: | 16A | Toton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 25/12/1965 | 48279 | Transfer in from: | 15A | Leicester Midland | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 25/12/1965 | 48282 | Transfer in from: | 16B | Kirkby in Ashfield | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 25/12/1965 | 48313 | Transfer in from: | 16C | Derby | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 25/12/1965 | 48315 | Transfer in from: | 15A | Leicester Midland | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 25/12/1965 | 48342 | Transfer in from: | 16B | Kirkby in Ashfield | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 25/12/1965 | 48361 | Transfer in from: | 15A | Leicester Midland | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 25/12/1965 | 48382 | Transfer in from: | 15A | Leicester Midland | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 25/12/1965 | 48384 | Transfer in from: | 16G | Westhouses | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 25/12/1965 | 48388 | Transfer in from: | 16G | Westhouses | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 25/12/1965 | 48432 | Transfer in from: | 16G | Westhouses | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 25/12/1965 | 48510 | Transfer in from: | 17A | Derby | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 25/12/1965 | 48552 | Transfer in from: | 15A | Leicester Midland | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 25/12/1965 | 48614 | Transfer in from: | 16E | Kirkby in Ashfield | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 25/12/1965 | 48617 | Transfer in from: | 15A | Leicester Midland | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 25/12/1965 | 48687 | Transfer in from: | 15A | Leicester Midland | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 25/12/1965 | 48696 | Transfer in from: | 15A | Leicester Midland | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 25/12/1965 | 48698 | Transfer in from: | 15A | Leicester Midland | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 25/12/1965 | 48699 | Transfer in from: | 16G | Westhouses | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 25/12/1965 | 90367 | Transfer out to: | 36C | Frodingham | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 25/12/1965 | 92145 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 25/12/1965 | 92146 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 25/12/1965 | 92173 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 25/12/1965 | 92182 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 25/12/1965 | 44848 | Transfer in from: | 16E | Kirkby in Ashfield | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 25/12/1965 | 44984 | Transfer in from: | 16A | Toton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 26/12/1965 | 63781 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 26/12/1965 | 63858 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 26/12/1965 | 61003 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 26/12/1965 | 61348 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 26/12/1965 | 61361 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 26/12/1965 | 90316 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 26/12/1965 | 90423 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 26/12/1965 | 90466 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 01/01/1966 | D2018 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 01/01/1966 | D2019 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 01/01/1966 | D2023 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 01/01/1966 | D2024 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 01/01/1966 | D2025 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 01/01/1966 | D2027 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 01/01/1966 | D4088 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 01/01/1966 | 90002 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 01/01/1966 | 90037 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 01/01/1966 | 90080 | Transfer out to: | 36C | Frodingham | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 01/01/1966 | 90148 | Transfer out to: | 36C | Frodingham | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 01/01/1966 | 90187 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 01/01/1966 | 90190 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 01/01/1966 | 90241 | Transfer out to: | 36C | Frodingham | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 01/01/1966 | 90384 | Transfer out to: | 36C | Frodingham | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 01/01/1966 | 90437 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 01/01/1966 | 90514 | Transfer out to: | 36C | Frodingham | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 02/01/1966 | 61145 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 02/01/1966 | 90295 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | D3/5 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 03/01/1966 | D3165 | Transfer out to: | 16D | Nottingham | ||
Diesel | D3/5 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 08/01/1966 | D3152 | Transfer in from: | 16D | Nottingham | ||
Diesel | D3/5 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 08/01/1966 | D3153 | Transfer in from: | 16D | Nottingham | ||
Diesel | D3/5 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 08/01/1966 | D3164 | Transfer in from: | 16D | Nottingham | ||
Diesel | D3/5 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 08/01/1966 | D3165 | Transfer in from: | 16D | Nottingham | ||
Diesel | D3/5 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 08/01/1966 | D3166 | Transfer in from: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Diesel | D3/5 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 08/01/1966 | D3166 | Transfer out to: | 16B | Colwick | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 08/01/1966 | D5195 | Transfer out to: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 15/01/1966 | 48185 | Transfer in from: | 15A | Leicester Midland | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 15/01/1966 | 48609 | Transfer in from: | 15A | Leicester Midland | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 15/01/1966 | 48685 | Transfer in from: | 15A | Leicester Midland | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 15/01/1966 | 63644 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 15/01/1966 | 63674 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 15/01/1966 | 63675 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 15/01/1966 | 63816 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 15/01/1966 | 63873 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | D3/5 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 05/02/1966 | D3154 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | D3/5 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 05/02/1966 | D3156 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | D3/5 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 05/02/1966 | D3157 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | D3/5 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 05/02/1966 | D3160 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | D3/5 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 05/02/1966 | D3162 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 05/02/1966 | 76051 | Transfer in from: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 05/02/1966 | 76075 | Transfer in from: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 05/02/1966 | 76089 | Transfer in from: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/02/1966 | 90104 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/02/1966 | 90413 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/02/1966 | 90533 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/02/1966 | 90606 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/02/1966 | 90669 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/02/1966 | 90689 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/02/1966 | 90706 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 19/02/1966 | 44936 | Transfer in from: | 2D | Banbury | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 19/02/1966 | 45114 | Transfer in from: | 2D | Banbury | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 19/02/1966 | 45222 | Transfer in from: | 2D | Banbury | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 19/02/1966 | 45288 | Transfer in from: | 2D | Banbury | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 19/02/1966 | 45324 | Transfer in from: | 2D | Banbury | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 19/02/1966 | 45392 | Transfer in from: | 2D | Banbury | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 19/02/1966 | 45426 | Transfer in from: | 2D | Banbury | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 19/02/1966 | 45454 | Transfer in from: | 2D | Banbury | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 19/02/1966 | 61092 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 19/02/1966 | 61281 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 19/02/1966 | 61390 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 12/03/1966 | 76085 | Transfer in from: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 12/03/1966 | 76099 | Transfer in from: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/04/1966 | 44848 | Transfer out to: | 10F | Rose Grove | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 02/04/1966 | 48698 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 02/04/1966 | 61089 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 02/04/1966 | 61302 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 30/04/1966 | 44659 | Transfer out to: | 8L | Aintree | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 28/05/1966 | 44839 | Transfer out to: | 9F | Heaton Mersey | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 28/05/1966 | 45114 | Transfer out to: | 9F | Heaton Mersey | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 28/05/1966 | 45190 | Transfer out to: | 9F | Heaton Mersey | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 28/05/1966 | 45288 | Transfer out to: | 9F | Heaton Mersey | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 28/05/1966 | 45392 | Transfer out to: | 9F | Heaton Mersey | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | m/e | 06/1966 | 45333 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | m/e | 06/1966 | 76085 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 25/06/1966 | 44665 | Transfer out to: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 25/06/1966 | 45454 | Transfer out to: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 16/07/1966 | 48137 | Transfer out to: | 16G | Westhouses | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 16/07/1966 | 48142 | Transfer out to: | 16E | Kirkby in Ashfield | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 16/07/1966 | 48282 | Transfer out to: | 16E | Kirkby in Ashfield | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 16/07/1966 | 48361 | Transfer out to: | 16G | Westhouses | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 16/07/1966 | 48432 | Transfer out to: | 16G | Westhouses | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 06/08/1966 | 76099 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 20/08/1966 | 44830 | Transfer out to: | 9F | Heaton Mersey | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 20/08/1966 | 44835 | Transfer out to: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 20/08/1966 | 44920 | Transfer out to: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 20/08/1966 | 45324 | Transfer out to: | 9F | Heaton Mersey | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 20/08/1966 | 45426 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 27/08/1966 | 44858 | Transfer in from: | 16C | Derby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 27/08/1966 | 45224 | Transfer in from: | 16C | Derby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 27/08/1966 | 45289 | Transfer in from: | 16C | Derby | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | m/e | 09/1966 | 48342 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 03/09/1966 | 48000 | Transfer out to: | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 03/09/1966 | 48197 | Transfer out to: | 9D | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 03/09/1966 | 48382 | Transfer out to: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 03/09/1966 | 48552 | Transfer out to: | 9L | Buxton (LNWR) | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 03/09/1966 | 48614 | Transfer out to: | 8G | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 03/09/1966 | 48750 | Transfer out to: | 8G | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 17/09/1966 | 48117 | Transfer in from: | 16F | Burton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 17/09/1966 | 48635 | Transfer in from: | 16F | Burton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 17/09/1966 | 48651 | Transfer in from: | 16F | Burton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 17/09/1966 | 48672 | Transfer in from: | 16F | Burton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 17/09/1966 | 48107 | Transfer out to: | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 17/09/1966 | 48258 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 24/09/1966 | 48350 | Transfer in from: | 16C | Derby | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 24/09/1966 | 48604 | Transfer in from: | 16C | Derby | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 24/09/1966 | 48728 | Transfer in from: | 17B | Burton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 24/09/1966 | 48507 | Transfer out to: | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 24/09/1966 | 48699 | Transfer out to: | 8E | Northwich | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 24/09/1966 | 76089 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 01/10/1966 | 48270 | Transfer in from: | 16C | Derby | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 01/10/1966 | 48359 | Transfer in from: | 16C | Derby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 08/10/1966 | 44811 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 08/10/1966 | 48414 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 08/10/1966 | 48635 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 15/10/1966 | 48388 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 22/10/1966 | 48073 | Transfer in from: | 16G | Westhouses | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 22/10/1966 | 48083 | Transfer in from: | 16G | Westhouses | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 22/10/1966 | 48143 | Transfer in from: | 16G | Westhouses | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 22/10/1966 | 48177 | Transfer in from: | 18B | Westhouses | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 22/10/1966 | 48214 | Transfer in from: | 16G | Westhouses | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 22/10/1966 | 48332 | Transfer in from: | 16G | Westhouses | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 22/10/1966 | 48370 | Transfer in from: | 16G | Westhouses | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 22/10/1966 | 48376 | Transfer in from: | 16G | Westhouses | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 22/10/1966 | 48538 | Transfer in from: | 16G | Westhouses | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 22/10/1966 | 48600 | Transfer in from: | 16G | Westhouses | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 22/10/1966 | 48620 | Transfer in from: | 18B | Westhouses | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 22/10/1966 | 48662 | Transfer in from: | 16G | Westhouses | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 22/10/1966 | 48678 | Transfer in from: | 16G | Westhouses | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 22/10/1966 | 48690 | Transfer in from: | 16G | Westhouses | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 22/10/1966 | 48763 | Transfer in from: | 16G | Westhouses | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 22/10/1966 | 45464 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 12/11/1966 | 44825 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 12/11/1966 | 44858 | Transfer out to: | 8L | Aintree | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 12/11/1966 | 44936 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 12/11/1966 | 45222 | Transfer out to: | 9D | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 12/11/1966 | 45267 | Transfer out to: | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/11/1966 | 48167 | Transfer out to: | 8G | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/11/1966 | 48170 | Transfer out to: | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/11/1966 | 48214 | Transfer out to: | 9H | Patricroft | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/11/1966 | 48380 | Transfer out to: | 9K | Bolton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/11/1966 | 48384 | Transfer out to: | 10A | Carnforth | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/11/1966 | 48393 | Transfer out to: | 10D | Lostock Hall | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/11/1966 | 48600 | Transfer out to: | 8L | Aintree | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/11/1966 | 48620 | Transfer out to: | 9D | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/11/1966 | 48678 | Transfer out to: | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/11/1966 | 48763 | Transfer out to: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 12/11/1966 | 76051 | Transfer out to: | 8G | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 12/11/1966 | 76075 | Transfer out to: | 8G | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 12/11/1966 | 44847 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 12/11/1966 | 44941 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 12/11/1966 | 44984 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 12/11/1966 | 45224 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 12/11/1966 | 45289 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/11/1966 | 48083 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/11/1966 | 48143 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/11/1966 | 48662 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/11/1966 | 48672 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 26/11/1966 | 48370 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 26/11/1966 | 48651 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 10/12/1966 | 48060 | Transfer out to: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 10/12/1966 | 48073 | Transfer out to: | 2E | Saltley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 10/12/1966 | 48117 | Transfer out to: | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 10/12/1966 | 48193 | Transfer out to: | 8G | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 10/12/1966 | 48315 | Transfer out to: | 8L | Aintree | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 10/12/1966 | 48332 | Transfer out to: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 10/12/1966 | 48350 | Transfer out to: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 10/12/1966 | 48510 | Transfer out to: | 10D | Lostock Hall | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 10/12/1966 | 48604 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 10/12/1966 | 48645 | Transfer out to: | 2E | Saltley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 17/12/1966 | 48279 | Transfer out to: | 16E | Kirkby in Ashfield | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 17/12/1966 | 48270 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/01/1967 | D2301 | Transfer out to: | Wolverton Works | |||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 07/01/1967 | 48313 | Transfer out to: | 9K | Bolton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 07/01/1967 | 48359 | Transfer out to: | 9H | Patricroft | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 07/01/1967 | 48609 | Transfer out to: | 9H | Patricroft | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 14/01/1967 | 48185 | Transfer out to: | 8G | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 14/01/1967 | 48376 | Transfer out to: | 9L | Buxton (LNWR) | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 14/01/1967 | 48617 | Transfer out to: | 8G | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 28/01/1967 | 45406 | Transfer out to: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 28/01/1967 | 48687 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 04/02/1967 | 48132 | Transfer out to: | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 04/02/1967 | 48177 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Oxley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 04/02/1967 | 48180 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Oxley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 04/02/1967 | 48212 | Transfer out to: | 8L | Aintree | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 04/02/1967 | 48538 | Transfer out to: | 2E | Saltley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 04/02/1967 | 48685 | Transfer out to: | 8E | Northwich | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 04/02/1967 | 48690 | Transfer out to: | 2E | Saltley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 04/02/1967 | 48696 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 04/02/1967 | 48728 | Transfer out to: | 2E | Saltley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 11/02/1967 | 48192 | Transfer out to: | 8G | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 24/06/1967 | 75016 | Transfer in from: | 6C | Croes Newydd | ||
Diesel | D3/5 | 0-6-0 | on | 08/07/1967 | D3165 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 08/07/1967 | 75016 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | D3/5 | 0-6-0 | on | 15/07/1967 | D3153 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | D3/5 | 0-6-0 | on | 15/07/1967 | D3154 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | D3/5 | 0-6-0 | on | 15/07/1967 | D3156 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | D3/5 | 0-6-0 | on | 15/07/1967 | D3166 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | D3/5 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/09/1967 | D3152 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | D3/5 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/09/1967 | D3157 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | D3/5 | 0-6-0 | on | 14/10/1967 | D3160 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 11/11/1967 | D3476 | Transfer in from: | 16A | Toton | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 11/11/1967 | D3497 | Transfer in from: | 16A | Toton | ||
Diesel | D3/5 | 0-6-0 | on | 18/11/1967 | D3162 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | D3/5 | 0-6-0 | on | 18/11/1967 | D3164 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 02/12/1967 | D2302 | Transfer out to: | 16C | Derby | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/12/1967 | D2300 | Transfer out to: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/12/1967 | D3442 | Transfer out to: | 16A | Toton | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/12/1967 | D3476 | Transfer out to: | 16A | Toton | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/12/1967 | D3489 | Transfer out to: | 16A | Toton | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/12/1967 | D3628 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | on | 13/04/1968 | D3497 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 11/05/1968 | D3490 | Transfer out to: | 16A | Toton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 27/07/1968 | D3403 | Transfer in from: | 16C | Derby | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 27/07/1968 | D3407 | Transfer in from: | 16C | Derby | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 27/07/1968 | D3425 | Transfer in from: | 16C | Derby | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 27/07/1968 | D3426 | Transfer in from: | 16C | Derby | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 27/07/1968 | D3790 | Transfer in from: | 15C | Leicester Midland | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | on | 27/07/1968 | D3625 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | on | 27/07/1968 | D3626 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | on | 27/07/1968 | D3627 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | on | 27/07/1968 | D4064 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | on | 27/07/1968 | D4086 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 18/04/1970 | D3403 | Transfer out to: | 16C | Derby | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 18/04/1970 | D3407 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 18/04/1970 | D3425 | Transfer out to: | 8J | Allerton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 18/04/1970 | D3426 | Transfer out to: | 16C | Derby | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 18/04/1970 | D3790 | Transfer out to: | 16F | Burton |