Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 151 Today
» 1091 Yesterday
» 151 Week
» 18933 Month
» 267226 Year
» 1151607 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Coventry


Type Class Wheels Period Date Number Event Code Depot Length of Stay Notes
Steam G1 0-8-0 4w/e 22/06/1946 8892 Transfer in from:        
Steam G2 0-8-0 w/e 20/12/1947 9440 Transfer in from:        
Steam G1 0-8-0 01/01/1948 8892 Snapshot 2F Coventry    
Steam G1 0-8-0 01/01/1948 8892 Snapshot 2F Coventry    
Steam G1 0-8-0 01/01/1948 9135 Snapshot        
Steam G2A 0-8-0 01/01/1948 9167 Snapshot        
Steam G2A 0-8-0 01/01/1948 9278 Snapshot        
Steam G2A 0-8-0 01/01/1948 9340 Snapshot        
Steam G2A 0-8-0 01/01/1948 9368 Snapshot        
Steam G2 0-8-0 01/01/1948 9423 Snapshot        
Steam G2 0-8-0 01/01/1948 9440 Snapshot 2F Coventry    
Steam G2 0-8-0 01/01/1948 9440 Snapshot 2F Coventry    
Steam G1 0-8-0 w/e 15/05/1948 9201 Transfer in from: 2B Bletchley    
Steam G2A 0-8-0 w/e 20/05/1948 49278 Transfer out to: 2A Rugby    
Steam 2F 0-6-0 w/e 05/06/1948 3725 Transfer in from:        
Steam G1 0-8-0 w/e 05/06/1948 9179 Transfer in from: 2B Bletchley    
Steam G1 0-8-0 w/e 19/06/1948 9201 Condemned      
Steam G1 0-8-0 m/e 08/1948 9135 Condemned      
Steam G2 0-8-0 3w/e 11/12/1948 9445 Transfer in from: 4A Shrewsbury    
Steam G2A 0-8-0 3w/e 11/12/1948 9167 Transfer out to: 3B Bushbury    
Steam G1 0-8-0 18/12/1948 9179 Condemned      
Steam G1 0-8-0 m/e 01/1949 48892 Condemned      
Steam G2A 0-8-0 5w/e 16/07/1949 49094 Transfer in from:        
Steam G2A 0-8-0 5w/e 16/07/1949 49104 Transfer in from: 3A Bescot    
Steam G2 0-8-0 3w/e 14/01/1950 49442 Transfer in from: 2A Rugby    
Steam G2 0-8-0 3w/e 14/01/1950 9441 Transfer in from: 2A Rugby    
Steam G2A 0-8-0 3w/e 14/01/1950 49104 Transfer out to: 10B Preston    
Steam G2A 0-8-0 3w/e 14/01/1950 49340 Transfer out to: 10C Patricroft    
Steam G2 0-8-0 4w/e 19/05/1951 49423 Transfer out to: 8A Edge Hill    
Steam G2 0-8-0 4w/e 08/09/1951 9417 Transfer in from: 10B Preston    
Steam G2A 0-8-0 4w/e 29/12/1951 49368 Transfer out to: 8A Edge Hill    
Steam G2 0-8-0 4w/e 18/04/1953 49415 Transfer in from: 5B Crewe South    
Steam G2 0-8-0 4w/e 18/04/1953 49425 Transfer in from: 2A Rugby    
Steam G2 0-8-0 4w/e 18/04/1953 49417 Transfer out to: 2A Rugby    
Steam G2A 0-8-0 4w/e 05/09/1953 49094 Transfer out to: 9G Northwich    
Steam G2 0-8-0 8w/e 19/06/1954 49411 Transfer in from: 8B Warrington Dallam    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 8w/e 16/07/1955 47359 Transfer in from: 1B Camden    
Diesel 11 0-6-0 4w/e 13/08/1955 12045 Transfer in from: 18A Toton    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 4w/e 13/08/1955 47359 Transfer out to: 5C Stafford    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 4w/e 05/11/1955 47338 Transfer in from: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 2F 0-6-0 4w/e 21/04/1956 58306 Transfer out to: 3E Monument Lane    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 4w/e 19/05/1956 46420 Transfer in from: 8D Widnes    
Steam G2 0-8-0 8w/e 20/04/1957 49440 Transfer out to: 85C Hereford    
Steam G2 0-8-0 4w/e 25/01/1958 49431 Transfer in from: 2F Market Harborough    
Steam G2 0-8-0 4w/e 25/01/1958 49411 Transfer out to: 3B Bushbury    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 15/11/1958 46420 Transfer out to: 2A Rugby    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 15/11/1958 47338 Transfer out to: 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam G2 0-8-0 w/e 15/11/1958 49415 Transfer out to: 2B Nuneaton    
Steam G2 0-8-0 w/e 15/11/1958 49425 Transfer out to: 2B Nuneaton    
Steam G2 0-8-0 w/e 15/11/1958 49431 Transfer out to: 2B Nuneaton    
Steam G2 0-8-0 w/e 15/11/1958 49441 Transfer out to: 2B Nuneaton    
Steam G2 0-8-0 w/e 15/11/1958 49442 Transfer out to: 2A Rugby    
Steam G2 0-8-0 m/e 11/1959 49445 Condemned