Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 233 Today
» 1011 Yesterday
» 233 Week
» 17569 Month
» 295365 Year
» 1179746 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Eastleigh


Type Class Wheels Period Date Number Event Code Depot Length of Stay Notes
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 4w/e 01/12/1947 121 Transfer in from:        
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 4w/e 01/12/1947 128 Transfer in from:        
Steam Large Hoppers 4-4-0 4w/e 01/12/1947 148 Transfer in from:        
Steam Large Hoppers 4-4-0 4w/e 01/12/1947 154 Transfer in from:        
Steam Large Hoppers 4-4-0 4w/e 01/12/1947 155 Transfer in from:        
Steam Large Hoppers 4-4-0 4w/e 01/12/1947 157 Transfer in from:        
Steam Large Hoppers 4-4-0 4w/e 01/12/1947 170 Transfer in from:        
Steam Large Hoppers 4-4-0 4w/e 01/12/1947 172 Transfer in from:        
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 4w/e 01/12/1947 286 Transfer in from:        
Steam Large Hoppers 4-4-0 4w/e 01/12/1947 411 Transfer in from:        
Steam Large Hoppers 4-4-0 4w/e 01/12/1947 437 Transfer in from:        
Steam D15 4-4-0 4w/e 01/12/1947 463 Transfer in from:        
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 4w/e 01/12/1947 740 Transfer in from:        
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 4w/e 01/12/1947 745 Transfer in from:        
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 4w/e 01/12/1947 748 Transfer in from:        
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 4w/e 01/12/1947 749 Transfer in from:        
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 4w/e 01/12/1947 752 Transfer in from:        
Steam D1M 0-4-2T 4w/e 01/12/1947 700 Transfer in from:        
Steam T1 0-4-4T 01/01/1948 1 Snapshot        
Steam B4 0-4-0T 01/01/1948 102 Snapshot        
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 01/01/1948 109 Snapshot        
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 01/01/1948 120 Snapshot        
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 01/01/1948 121 Snapshot ELH Eastleigh    
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 01/01/1948 121 Snapshot ELH Eastleigh    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 01/01/1948 125 Snapshot        
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 01/01/1948 128 Snapshot ELH Eastleigh    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 01/01/1948 128 Snapshot ELH Eastleigh    
Steam Q1 0-6-0 01/01/1948 14 Snapshot        
Steam Large Hoppers 4-4-0 01/01/1948 148 Snapshot ELH Eastleigh    
Steam Large Hoppers 4-4-0 01/01/1948 148 Snapshot ELH Eastleigh    
Steam Q1 0-6-0 01/01/1948 15 Snapshot        
Steam Small Hoppers 4-4-0 01/01/1948 150 Snapshot        
Steam Small Hoppers 4-4-0 01/01/1948 151 Snapshot        
Steam Large Hoppers 4-4-0 01/01/1948 154 Snapshot ELH Eastleigh    
Steam Large Hoppers 4-4-0 01/01/1948 154 Snapshot ELH Eastleigh    
Steam Large Hoppers 4-4-0 01/01/1948 155 Snapshot ELH Eastleigh    
Steam Large Hoppers 4-4-0 01/01/1948 155 Snapshot ELH Eastleigh    
Steam Large Hoppers 4-4-0 01/01/1948 157 Snapshot ELH Eastleigh    
Steam Large Hoppers 4-4-0 01/01/1948 157 Snapshot ELH Eastleigh    
Steam Large Hoppers 4-4-0 01/01/1948 159 Snapshot        
Steam Q1 0-6-0 01/01/1948 16 Snapshot        
Steam Large Hoppers 4-4-0 01/01/1948 165 Snapshot        
Steam Q1 0-6-0 01/01/1948 17 Snapshot        
Steam Large Hoppers 4-4-0 01/01/1948 170 Snapshot FRA Fratton    
Steam Large Hoppers 4-4-0 01/01/1948 171 Snapshot        
Steam Large Hoppers 4-4-0 01/01/1948 172 Snapshot FRA Fratton    
Steam Large Hoppers 4-4-0 01/01/1948 175 Snapshot        
Steam Q1 0-6-0 01/01/1948 18 Snapshot        
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 01/01/1948 1827 Snapshot        
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 01/01/1948 1829 Snapshot        
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 01/01/1948 1866 Snapshot        
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 01/01/1948 1867 Snapshot        
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 01/01/1948 1870 Snapshot        
Steam Q1 0-6-0 01/01/1948 19 Snapshot        
Steam T1 0-4-4T 01/01/1948 2 Snapshot        
Steam Q1 0-6-0 01/01/1948 20 Snapshot        
Steam O2 0-4-4T 01/01/1948 200 Snapshot        
Steam Q1 0-6-0 01/01/1948 21 Snapshot        
Steam O2 0-4-4T 01/01/1948 213 Snapshot        
Steam Black Tanks 0-6-0T 01/01/1948 2133 Snapshot        
Steam Black Tanks 0-6-0T 01/01/1948 2147 Snapshot        
Steam E1-1 0-6-0T 01/01/1948 2160 Snapshot        
Steam Q1 0-6-0 01/01/1948 22 Snapshot        
Steam D1M 0-4-2T 01/01/1948 2239 Snapshot        
Steam O2 0-4-4T 01/01/1948 225 Snapshot        
Steam D1M 0-4-2T 01/01/1948 2259 Snapshot ? Eastleigh Works    
Steam Q1 0-6-0 01/01/1948 23 Snapshot        
Steam O2 0-4-4T 01/01/1948 231 Snapshot        
Steam D1M 0-4-2T 01/01/1948 2361 Snapshot ? Eastleigh Works    
Steam Q1 0-6-0 01/01/1948 24 Snapshot        
Steam G6 0-6-0T 01/01/1948 240 Snapshot        
Steam E6 0-6-2T 01/01/1948 2409 Snapshot        
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 01/01/1948 242 Snapshot        
Steam Q1 0-6-0 01/01/1948 25 Snapshot        
Steam Radials 0-6-2T 01/01/1948 2510 Snapshot        
Steam Black Tanks 0-6-0T 01/01/1948 2609 Snapshot        
Steam G6 0-6-0T 01/01/1948 261 Snapshot        
Steam G6 0-6-0T 01/01/1948 264 Snapshot        
Steam G6 0-6-0T 01/01/1948 267 Snapshot        
Steam D1M 0-4-2T 01/01/1948 2699 Snapshot ? Eastleigh Works    
Steam G6 0-6-0T 01/01/1948 272 Snapshot        
Steam G6 0-6-0T 01/01/1948 274 Snapshot        
Steam G6 0-6-0T 01/01/1948 275 Snapshot        
Steam G6 0-6-0T 01/01/1948 277 Snapshot        
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 01/01/1948 286 Snapshot ELH Eastleigh    
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 01/01/1948 286 Snapshot ELH Eastleigh    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 01/01/1948 29 Snapshot        
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 01/01/1948 302 Snapshot        
Steam Black Motors 0-6-0 01/01/1948 306 Snapshot        
Steam Jumbos 0-6-0 01/01/1948 3101 Snapshot        
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 01/01/1948 313 Snapshot        
Steam Black Motors 0-6-0 01/01/1948 316 Snapshot        
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 01/01/1948 336 Snapshot        
Steam Jumbos 0-6-0 01/01/1948 3397 Snapshot        
Steam Small Hoppers 4-4-0 01/01/1948 341 Snapshot        
Steam Small Hoppers 4-4-0 01/01/1948 345 Snapshot        
Steam Black Motors 0-6-0 01/01/1948 350 Snapshot        
Steam Jumbos 0-6-0 01/01/1948 3509 Snapshot        
Steam G6 0-6-0T 01/01/1948 351 Snapshot        
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 01/01/1948 357 Snapshot        
Steam T1 0-4-4T 01/01/1948 366 Snapshot EXJ Exmouth Junction    
Steam T1 0-4-4T 01/01/1948 367 Snapshot EXJ Exmouth Junction    
Steam Potato Cans 0-4-0T 01/01/1948 3741 Snapshot        
Steam Potato Cans 0-4-0T 01/01/1948 3744 Snapshot        
Steam Small Hoppers 4-4-0 01/01/1948 385 Snapshot        
Steam S11 4-4-0 01/01/1948 402 Snapshot        
Steam S11 4-4-0 01/01/1948 403 Snapshot        
Steam S11 4-4-0 01/01/1948 404 Snapshot        
Steam Large Hoppers 4-4-0 01/01/1948 406 Snapshot        
Steam Large Hoppers 4-4-0 01/01/1948 411 Snapshot FRA Fratton    
Steam Bulldogs 4-4-0 01/01/1948 420 Snapshot        
Steam Bulldogs 4-4-0 01/01/1948 422 Snapshot        
Steam Bulldogs 4-4-0 01/01/1948 423 Snapshot        
Steam Bulldogs 4-4-0 01/01/1948 428 Snapshot        
Steam Bulldogs 4-4-0 01/01/1948 430 Snapshot        
Steam Large Hoppers 4-4-0 01/01/1948 437 Snapshot ELH Eastleigh    
Steam Large Hoppers 4-4-0 01/01/1948 437 Snapshot ELH Eastleigh    
Steam D15 4-4-0 01/01/1948 463 Snapshot ELH Eastleigh    
Steam D15 4-4-0 01/01/1948 463 Snapshot ELH Eastleigh    
Steam D15 4-4-0 01/01/1948 464 Snapshot        
Steam D15 4-4-0 01/01/1948 465 Snapshot        
Steam D15 4-4-0 01/01/1948 466 Snapshot        
Steam D15 4-4-0 01/01/1948 467 Snapshot        
Steam D15 4-4-0 01/01/1948 468 Snapshot        
Steam D15 4-4-0 01/01/1948 469 Snapshot        
Steam D15 4-4-0 01/01/1948 470 Snapshot        
Steam D15 4-4-0 01/01/1948 471 Snapshot        
Steam D15 4-4-0 01/01/1948 472 Snapshot        
Steam H15 4-6-0 01/01/1948 473 Snapshot        
Steam H15 4-6-0 01/01/1948 474 Snapshot        
Steam H15 4-6-0 01/01/1948 478 Snapshot        
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 01/01/1948 479 Snapshot        
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 01/01/1948 48 Snapshot        
Steam T1 0-4-4T 01/01/1948 5 Snapshot        
Steam H15 4-6-0 01/01/1948 521 Snapshot        
Steam H15 4-6-0 01/01/1948 522 Snapshot        
Steam H15 4-6-0 01/01/1948 523 Snapshot        
Steam H15 4-6-0 01/01/1948 524 Snapshot        
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 01/01/1948 53 Snapshot        
Steam Q 0-6-0 01/01/1948 530 Snapshot        
Steam Q 0-6-0 01/01/1948 532 Snapshot        
Steam Q 0-6-0 01/01/1948 535 Snapshot        
Steam Q 0-6-0 01/01/1948 536 Snapshot        
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 01/01/1948 674 Snapshot        
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 01/01/1948 705 Snapshot        
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 01/01/1948 707 Snapshot        
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 01/01/1948 713 Snapshot FRA Fratton    
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 01/01/1948 722 Snapshot FRA Fratton    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 01/01/1948 737 Snapshot        
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 01/01/1948 739 Snapshot        
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 01/01/1948 740 Snapshot ELH Eastleigh    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 01/01/1948 740 Snapshot ELH Eastleigh    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 01/01/1948 741 Snapshot        
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 01/01/1948 745 Snapshot ELH Eastleigh    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 01/01/1948 745 Snapshot ELH Eastleigh    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 01/01/1948 748 Snapshot ELH Eastleigh    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 01/01/1948 748 Snapshot ELH Eastleigh    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 01/01/1948 749 Snapshot ELH Eastleigh    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 01/01/1948 749 Snapshot ELH Eastleigh    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 01/01/1948 750 Snapshot        
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 01/01/1948 751 Snapshot        
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 01/01/1948 752 Snapshot ELH Eastleigh    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 01/01/1948 752 Snapshot ELH Eastleigh    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 01/01/1948 754 Snapshot        
Steam 756 0-6-0T 01/01/1948 756 Snapshot        
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 01/01/1948 777 Snapshot        
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 01/01/1948 784 Snapshot        
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 01/01/1948 785 Snapshot        
Steam T1 0-4-4T 01/01/1948 8 Snapshot        
Steam B4 0-4-0T 01/01/1948 82 Snapshot        
Steam B4 0-4-0T 01/01/1948 87 Snapshot        
Steam B4 0-4-0T 01/01/1948 88 Snapshot        
Steam Z 0-8-0T 01/01/1948 952 Snapshot        
Steam B4 0-4-0T 01/01/1948 96 Snapshot        
Steam B4 0-4-0T 4w/e 02/01/1948 102 Transfer in from: ELH Eastleigh    
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 4w/e 02/01/1948 713 Transfer in from: ELH Eastleigh    
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 4w/e 02/01/1948 722 Transfer in from: ELH Eastleigh    
Steam 756 0-6-0T 4w/e 02/01/1948 756 Transfer in from: ELH Eastleigh    
Steam B4 0-4-0T 4w/e 02/01/1948 96 Transfer in from: ELH Eastleigh    
Steam B4 0-4-0T 4w/e 02/01/1948 102 Transfer out to: ELH Eastleigh    
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 4w/e 02/01/1948 713 Transfer out to: ELH Eastleigh    
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 4w/e 02/01/1948 722 Transfer out to: ELH Eastleigh    
Steam 756 0-6-0T 4w/e 02/01/1948 756 Transfer out to: ELH Eastleigh    
Steam B4 0-4-0T 4w/e 02/01/1948 96 Transfer out to: ELH Eastleigh    
Steam Radials 0-6-2T 8w/e 01/03/1948 2562 Transfer in from: FRA Fratton    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 8w/e 01/03/1948 34036 Transfer in from: BAT Stewarts Lane    
Steam O2 0-4-4T 8w/e 01/03/1948 200 Transfer out to: WAD Wadebridge    
Steam Small Hoppers 4-4-0 8w/e 01/03/1948 150 Condemned      
Steam D1M 0-4-2T 8w/e 01/03/1948 2699 Condemned      
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 01/04/1948 34019 Transfer in from: EXJ Exmouth Junction    
Steam D1M 0-4-2T 4w/e 01/04/1948 2239 Condemned      
Steam D1M 0-4-2T 4w/e 01/04/1948 2259 Condemned      
Steam D1M 0-4-2T 4w/e 01/04/1948 2361 Condemned      
Steam Large Hoppers 4-4-0 7w/e 01/06/1948 166 Reinstated FRA Fratton    
Steam S11 4-4-0 7w/e 01/06/1948 396 Reinstated FEL Feltham    
Steam Bulldogs 4-4-0 7w/e 01/06/1948 433 Reinstated GFD Guildford    
Steam Large Hoppers 4-4-0 7w/e 01/06/1948 165 To Store      
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 7w/e 01/06/1948 302 To Store      
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 7w/e 01/06/1948 30707 To Store      
Steam Small Hoppers 4-4-0 7w/e 01/06/1948 341 To Store      
Steam Bulldogs 4-4-0 7w/e 01/06/1948 422 To Store      
Steam Bulldogs 4-4-0 7w/e 01/06/1948 430 To Store      
Steam H15 4-6-0 7w/e 01/06/1948 477 Transfer in from: 9E Nine Elms    
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 7w/e 01/06/1948 711 Transfer in from: PLY Plymouth Friary    
Steam B4 0-4-0T 7w/e 01/06/1948 98 Transfer in from: SOT Southampton Docks    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 7w/e 01/06/1948 737 Transfer out to: BM Bournemouth    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 7w/e 01/06/1948 739 Transfer out to: BM Bournemouth    
Steam B4 0-4-0T 7w/e 01/06/1948 88 Transfer out to: BAT Stewarts Lane    
Steam Black Tanks 0-6-0T 30/06/1948 2609 Condemned      
Steam B4 0-4-0T 8w/e 01/08/1948 101 Transfer in from: 9E Nine Elms    
Steam USA 0-6-0T 8w/e 01/08/1948 69 Transfer in from: SOT Southampton Docks    
Steam S11 4-4-0 8w/e 01/08/1948 403 Transfer out to: BM Bournemouth    
Steam B4 0-4-0T 8w/e 01/08/1948 98 Transfer out to: 9E Nine Elms    
Steam T1 0-4-4T m/e 10/1948 366 Condemned      
Steam B4 0-4-0T m/e 11/1948 101 Condemned      
Steam G6 0-6-0T m/e 11/1948 261 Condemned      
Steam Lord Nelson 4-6-0 08/01/1949 30850 Transfer in from: BM Bournemouth    
Steam T1 0-4-4T m/e 02/1949 30002 Condemned      
Steam G6 0-6-0T m/e 02/1949 30264 Condemned      
Steam G6 0-6-0T m/e 02/1949 30267 Condemned      
Steam Small Hoppers 4-4-0 m/e 02/1949 30385 Condemned      
Steam G6 0-6-0T m/e 03/1949 30240 Condemned      
Steam G6 0-6-0T m/e 03/1949 30351 Condemned      
Steam T1 0-4-4T m/e 05/1949 30008 Condemned      
Steam D1M 0-4-2T m/e 05/1949 700 Condemned      
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 4w/e 30/06/1949 30754 Transfer in from: ELH Eastleigh    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 4w/e 30/06/1949 30754 Transfer out to: ELH Eastleigh    
Steam T1 0-4-4T m/e 07/1949 30001 Condemned      
Steam Small Hoppers 4-4-0 m/e 09/1949 30345 Condemned      
Steam Large Hoppers 4-4-0 5w/e 29/10/1949 30161 Transfer in from: DOR Dorchester    
Steam Black Motors 0-6-0 5w/e 29/10/1949 30700 Transfer in from: BM Bournemouth    
Steam G6 0-6-0T 5w/e 29/10/1949 30274 Transfer out to: YEO Yeovil Town    
Steam G6 0-6-0T m/e 12/1949 30275 Condemned      
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 6w/e 12/12/1949 30752 Transfer in from: ELH Eastleigh    
Steam G6 0-6-0T 6w/e 12/12/1949 30272 Transfer out to: BAS Basingstoke    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 6w/e 12/12/1949 30752 Transfer out to: ELH Eastleigh    
Steam T1 0-4-4T m/e 01/1950 30005 Condemned      
Steam Small Hoppers 4-4-0 m/e 02/1950 30151 Condemned      
Steam Large Hoppers 4-4-0 m/e 02/1950 30161 Condemned      
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 4w/e 17/06/1950 30336 To Store      
Steam O2 0-4-4T 4w/e 17/06/1950 30231 Transfer out to: 71C Dorchester    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 4w/e 17/06/1950 30750 Transfer out to: 71B Bournemouth    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 4w/e 17/06/1950 30754 Transfer out to: 71B Bournemouth    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 4w/e 17/06/1950 30031 Transfer in from: 72B Salisbury    
Steam Large Hoppers 4-4-0 m/e 07/1950 30166 Condemned      
Steam Q 0-6-0 4w/e 09/09/1950 30531 Transfer in from: HOR Horsham    
Steam Q 0-6-0 4w/e 09/09/1950 30542 Transfer in from: HOR Horsham    
Steam Q 0-6-0 4w/e 09/09/1950 30543 Transfer in from: HOR Horsham    
Steam Q 0-6-0 4w/e 09/09/1950 30544 Transfer in from: TWW Tunbridge Wells West    
Steam Bulldogs 4-4-0 4w/e 09/09/1950 422 Transfer in from:        
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 4w/e 09/09/1950 31829 Transfer out to: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam Q1 0-6-0 4w/e 09/09/1950 33014 Transfer out to: 70C Guildford    
Steam Q1 0-6-0 4w/e 09/09/1950 33015 Transfer out to: 70C Guildford    
Steam Q1 0-6-0 4w/e 09/09/1950 33016 Transfer out to: 70C Guildford    
Steam Large Hoppers 4-4-0 4w/e 07/10/1950 30414 Transfer in from: FRA Fratton    
Steam Jumbos 0-6-0 4w/e 07/10/1950 30565 Transfer in from: GFD Guildford    
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 4w/e 07/10/1950 30726 Transfer in from: BAT Stewarts Lane    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 4w/e 07/10/1950 30787 Transfer in from: BM Bournemouth    
Steam E6 0-6-2T 4w/e 07/10/1950 32409 Transfer in from: ELH Eastleigh    
Steam E6 0-6-2T 4w/e 07/10/1950 32412 Transfer in from: BA Bricklayers Arms    
Steam E6 0-6-2T 4w/e 07/10/1950 32416 Transfer in from: NORW Norwood Junction    
Steam B4 0-4-0T 4w/e 07/10/1950 96 Transfer in from: ELH Eastleigh    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 4w/e 07/10/1950 30745 Transfer out to: 70D Basingstoke    
Steam E6 0-6-2T 4w/e 07/10/1950 32409 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam B4 0-4-0T 4w/e 07/10/1950 96 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam H15 4-6-0 4w/e 13/11/1950 30476 Transfer in from: SAL Salisbury    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 4w/e 13/11/1950 30667 Transfer in from: 9E Nine Elms    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 4w/e 13/11/1950 30778 Transfer in from: BAT Stewarts Lane    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 4w/e 13/11/1950 31866 Transfer out to: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 4w/e 13/11/1950 31867 Transfer out to: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 4w/e 13/11/1950 31870 Transfer out to: 72D Plymouth Friary    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 4w/e 08/12/1950 127 Transfer in from: SAL Salisbury    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 4w/e 08/12/1950 30243 Transfer in from: SAL Salisbury    
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 4w/e 08/12/1950 30285 Transfer in from:        
Steam Bulldogs 4-4-0 4w/e 08/12/1950 30421 Transfer in from: SAL Salisbury    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 4w/e 08/12/1950 30744 Transfer in from: EXJ Exmouth Junction    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 4w/e 08/12/1950 30745 Transfer in from: 70D Basingstoke    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 4w/e 08/12/1950 30746 Transfer in from: EXJ Exmouth Junction    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 4w/e 08/12/1950 30747 Transfer in from: EXJ Exmouth Junction    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 4w/e 08/12/1950 30748 Transfer in from: ELH Eastleigh    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 4w/e 08/12/1950 30750 Transfer in from: 71B Bournemouth    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 4w/e 08/12/1950 30751 Transfer in from: ELH Eastleigh    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 4w/e 08/12/1950 30753 Transfer in from: 9E Nine Elms    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 4w/e 08/12/1950 30754 Transfer in from: 71B Bournemouth    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 4w/e 08/12/1950 30780 Transfer in from: BAT Stewarts Lane    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 4w/e 08/12/1950 30053 Transfer out to: 71D Fratton    
Steam Bulldogs 4-4-0 4w/e 08/12/1950 30433 Transfer out to: 70C Guildford    
Steam H15 4-6-0 4w/e 08/12/1950 30521 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 4w/e 08/12/1950 30705 Transfer out to: 71B Bournemouth    
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 4w/e 08/12/1950 30711 Transfer out to: 71D Fratton    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 4w/e 08/12/1950 30748 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 4w/e 08/12/1950 30751 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 4w/e 08/12/1950 30784 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 4w/e 08/12/1950 30785 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 4w/e 08/12/1950 30787 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam E1-1 0-6-0T 4w/e 08/12/1950 32160 Transfer out to: 70C Guildford    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 08/12/1950 34036 Transfer out to: 72D Plymouth Friary    
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 4w/e 05/02/1951 30281 Transfer in from: BAT Stewarts Lane    
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 4w/e 05/02/1951 30283 Transfer in from: EXJ Exmouth Junction    
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 4w/e 05/02/1951 30288 Transfer in from: SAL Salisbury    
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 4w/e 05/02/1951 30289 Transfer in from: SAL Salisbury    
Steam Bulldogs 4-4-0 4w/e 05/02/1951 30420 Transfer in from: ELH Eastleigh    
Steam Bulldogs 4-4-0 4w/e 05/02/1951 30424 Transfer in from: 70C Guildford    
Steam Bulldogs 4-4-0 4w/e 05/02/1951 30425 Transfer in from: FRA Fratton    
Steam Bulldogs 4-4-0 4w/e 05/02/1951 30426 Transfer in from: 71D Fratton    
Steam Bulldogs 4-4-0 4w/e 05/02/1951 30427 Transfer in from: 71D Fratton    
Steam Bulldogs 4-4-0 4w/e 05/02/1951 30428 Transfer in from: ELH Eastleigh    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 4w/e 05/02/1951 30755 Transfer in from: 9E Nine Elms    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 4w/e 05/02/1951 30781 Transfer in from: BAT Stewarts Lane    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 4w/e 05/02/1951 30782 Transfer in from: 9E Nine Elms    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 4w/e 05/02/1951 30783 Transfer in from: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 4w/e 05/02/1951 30784 Transfer in from: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 4w/e 05/02/1951 30785 Transfer in from: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 4w/e 05/02/1951 30786 Transfer in from: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 4w/e 05/02/1951 30787 Transfer in from: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 4w/e 05/02/1951 30788 Transfer in from: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 4w/e 05/02/1951 30789 Transfer in from: 70D Basingstoke    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 4w/e 05/02/1951 30790 Transfer in from: 70D Basingstoke    
Steam Black Tanks 0-6-0T 4w/e 05/02/1951 32151 Transfer in from: BA Bricklayers Arms    
Steam G6 0-6-0T 4w/e 05/02/1951 30277 Transfer out to: 70D Basingstoke    
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 4w/e 05/02/1951 30285 Transfer out to: 71C Dorchester    
Steam Bulldogs 4-4-0 4w/e 05/02/1951 30420 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam Bulldogs 4-4-0 4w/e 05/02/1951 30428 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam H15 4-6-0 4w/e 05/02/1951 30522 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam H15 4-6-0 4w/e 05/02/1951 30523 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam H15 4-6-0 4w/e 05/02/1951 30524 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 4w/e 05/02/1951 30726 Transfer out to: 72B Salisbury    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 4w/e 05/02/1951 30744 Transfer out to: 70D Basingstoke    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 4w/e 05/02/1951 30745 Transfer out to: 70D Basingstoke    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 4w/e 05/02/1951 30777 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 4w/e 05/02/1951 30778 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam Black Tanks 0-6-0T 4w/e 05/02/1951 32147 Transfer out to: 75A Brighton    
Steam Large Hoppers 4-4-0 m/e 03/1951 30159 Condemned      
Steam S11 4-4-0 m/e 03/1951 30402 Condemned      
Steam Large Hoppers 4-4-0 6w/e 20/03/1951 30442 Transfer in from: 70C Guildford    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 6w/e 20/03/1951 30480 Transfer in from: FRA Fratton    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 6w/e 20/03/1951 30481 Transfer in from: GFD Guildford    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 6w/e 20/03/1951 30109 Transfer out to: 70C Guildford    
Steam Large Hoppers 4-4-0 6w/e 20/03/1951 30414 Transfer out to: 72C Yeovil Town    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 6w/e 20/03/1951 30674 Transfer out to: 72B Salisbury    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 6w/e 20/03/1951 30747 Transfer out to: 70D Basingstoke    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 6w/e 20/03/1951 30781 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 6w/e 20/03/1951 30786 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam Black Tanks 0-6-0T 6w/e 20/03/1951 32133 Transfer out to: 71I Southampton Docks    
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 m/e 04/1951 30121 Condemned      
Steam Large Hoppers 4-4-0 m/e 04/1951 30154 Condemned      
Steam Large Hoppers 4-4-0 m/e 04/1951 30155 Condemned      
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 m/e 04/1951 30286 Condemned      
Steam Bulldogs 4-4-0 m/e 04/1951 30428 Condemned      
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 m/e 04/1951 30713 Condemned      
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 m/e 04/1951 30722 Condemned      
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 11/04/1951 34019 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam T1 0-4-4T m/e 05/1951 30367 Condemned      
Steam O2 0-4-4T 4w/e 12/05/1951 30229 Transfer in from: DOR Dorchester    
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 4w/e 12/05/1951 30284 Transfer in from: DOR Dorchester    
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 4w/e 12/05/1951 30285 Transfer in from: 71C Dorchester    
Steam Large Hoppers 4-4-0 4w/e 12/05/1951 30442 Transfer in from: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 4w/e 12/05/1951 30480 Transfer in from: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam E6 0-6-2T 4w/e 12/05/1951 32413 Transfer in from: BA Bricklayers Arms    
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 4w/e 12/05/1951 30120 Transfer out to: 71C Dorchester    
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 4w/e 12/05/1951 30313 Transfer out to:        
Steam Large Hoppers 4-4-0 4w/e 12/05/1951 30442 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 4w/e 12/05/1951 30480 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 4w/e 12/05/1951 30667 Transfer out to: 72B Salisbury    
Steam E6 0-6-2T 4w/e 12/05/1951 32409 Transfer out to: 73B Bricklayers Arms    
Steam Large Hoppers 4-4-0 m/e 06/1951 30406 Condemned      
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 7w/e 27/06/1951 30379 Transfer in from: 9E Nine Elms    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 7w/e 27/06/1951 30481 Transfer in from: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 7w/e 27/06/1951 30048 Transfer out to: 75D Horsham    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 7w/e 27/06/1951 30357 Transfer out to: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 7w/e 27/06/1951 30481 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam Jumbos 0-6-0 7w/e 27/06/1951 30571 Transfer out to: 70B Feltham    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 7w/e 27/06/1951 30782 Transfer out to: 71B Bournemouth    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 7w/e 27/06/1951 30783 Transfer out to: 71B Bournemouth    
Steam Bulldogs 4-4-0 m/e 07/1951 30423 Condemned      
Steam Bulldogs 4-4-0 m/e 07/1951 30424 Condemned      
Steam Large Hoppers 4-4-0 m/e 09/1951 30171 Condemned      
Steam Bulldogs 4-4-0 m/e 09/1951 30420 Condemned      
Steam Bulldogs 4-4-0 m/e 09/1951 30421 Condemned      
Steam Bulldogs 4-4-0 m/e 09/1951 30422 Condemned      
Steam Bulldogs 4-4-0 m/e 09/1951 30425 Condemned      
Steam S11 4-4-0 m/e 10/1951 30404 Condemned      
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 4w/e 06/10/1951 30128 Transfer out to: 72C Yeovil Town    
Steam S11 4-4-0 4w/e 06/10/1951 30396 Transfer out to: 71C Dorchester    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 4w/e 06/10/1951 30754 Transfer out to: 70D Basingstoke    
Steam Bulldogs 4-4-0 m/e 11/1951 30426 Condemned      
Steam Bulldogs 4-4-0 m/e 11/1951 30427 Condemned      
Steam 756 0-6-0T m/e 11/1951 30756 Condemned      
Steam Large Hoppers 4-4-0 m/e 12/1951 30175 Condemned      
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 m/e 12/1951 30281 Condemned      
Steam Large Hoppers 4-4-0 m/e 12/1951 30442 Condemned      
Steam D15 4-4-0 m/e 12/1951 30463 Condemned      
Steam D15 4-4-0 m/e 12/1951 30469 Condemned      
Steam German Engines 4-4-0 4w/e 21/01/1952 31771 Transfer in from: AFD Ashford    
Steam German Engines 4-4-0 4w/e 21/01/1952 31772 Transfer in from: AFD Ashford    
Steam German Engines 4-4-0 4w/e 21/01/1952 31773 Transfer in from: AFD Ashford    
Steam German Engines 4-4-0 4w/e 21/01/1952 31774 Transfer in from: AFD Ashford    
Steam German Engines 4-4-0 4w/e 21/01/1952 31775 Transfer in from: AFD Ashford    
Steam German Engines 4-4-0 4w/e 21/01/1952 31776 Transfer in from: 74A Ashford    
Steam German Engines 4-4-0 4w/e 21/01/1952 31777 Transfer in from: 74A Ashford    
Steam German Engines 4-4-0 4w/e 21/01/1952 31778 Transfer in from: 74B Ramsgate    
Steam German Engines 4-4-0 4w/e 21/01/1952 31779 Transfer in from: 74B Ramsgate    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 4w/e 21/01/1952 31805 Transfer in from: GFD Guildford    
Steam Q1 0-6-0 4w/e 21/01/1952 33016 Transfer in from: 71D Fratton    
Steam Large Hoppers 4-4-0 m/e 03/1952 30148 Condemned      
Steam Large Hoppers 4-4-0 m/e 03/1952 30157 Condemned      
Steam D15 4-4-0 m/e 03/1952 30468 Condemned      
Steam D15 4-4-0 m/e 03/1952 30472 Condemned      
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 4w/e 19/03/1952 30030 Transfer in from: EXJ Exmouth Junction    
Steam P 0-6-0T 4w/e 19/03/1952 31027 Transfer in from: DOV Dover    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 4w/e 19/03/1952 31808 Transfer in from: FAV Faversham    
Steam Radials 0-6-2T 4w/e 19/03/1952 32486 Transfer in from: BTN Brighton    
Steam Q 0-6-0 4w/e 19/03/1952 30544 Transfer out to: 75E Three Bridges    
Steam Large Hoppers 4-4-0 m/e 06/1952 30437 Condemned      
Steam B4 0-4-0T 9w/e 30/06/1952 30088 Transfer in from: BAT Stewarts Lane    
Steam Z 0-8-0T 9w/e 30/06/1952 30955 Transfer in from: 74A Ashford    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 9w/e 30/06/1952 41293 Transfer in from:        
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 9w/e 30/06/1952 41303 Transfer in from: 73B Bricklayers Arms    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 9w/e 30/06/1952 41304 Transfer in from: 73E Faversham    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 9w/e 30/06/1952 30242 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 9w/e 30/06/1952 30243 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 9w/e 30/06/1952 30753 Transfer out to: 70D Basingstoke    
Steam P 0-6-0T 9w/e 30/06/1952 31027 Transfer out to: 71D Fratton    
Steam German Engines 4-4-0 9w/e 30/06/1952 31771 Transfer out to: 74A Ashford    
Steam German Engines 4-4-0 9w/e 30/06/1952 31772 Transfer out to: 74A Ashford    
Steam German Engines 4-4-0 9w/e 30/06/1952 31773 Transfer out to: 74A Ashford    
Steam German Engines 4-4-0 9w/e 30/06/1952 31779 Transfer out to: 74B Ramsgate    
Steam Radials 0-6-2T 9w/e 30/06/1952 32486 Transfer out to: 72B Salisbury    
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 01/08/1952 82014 1st Allocation        
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 13/08/1952 82015 1st Allocation        
Steam Small Radials 0-6-2T 6w/e 13/08/1952 32453 Transfer in from: BA Bricklayers Arms    
Steam Small Radials 0-6-2T 6w/e 13/08/1952 32460 Transfer in from: BA Bricklayers Arms    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 6w/e 13/08/1952 41305 Transfer in from: 73E Faversham    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 6w/e 13/08/1952 41303 Transfer out to: 73B Bricklayers Arms    
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 21/08/1952 82016 1st Allocation        
Steam D15 4-4-0 m/e 10/1952 30466 Condemned      
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 8w/e 07/10/1952 30133 Transfer in from: EXJ Exmouth Junction    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 8w/e 07/10/1952 30376 Transfer in from: EXJ Exmouth Junction    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 8w/e 07/10/1952 30377 Transfer in from: FRA Fratton    
Steam Q1 0-6-0 8w/e 07/10/1952 33038 Transfer in from: 73A Stewarts Lane    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 8w/e 07/10/1952 31808 Transfer out to: 71D Fratton    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 m/e 12/1952 76005 1st Allocation        
Steam D15 4-4-0 m/e 12/1952 30470 Condemned      
Steam L1 4-4-0 5w/e 11/12/1952 31785 Transfer in from: 74A Ashford    
Steam L1 4-4-0 5w/e 11/12/1952 31786 Transfer in from: 74A Ashford    
Steam L1 4-4-0 5w/e 11/12/1952 31787 Transfer in from: 74A Ashford    
Steam L1 4-4-0 5w/e 11/12/1952 31788 Transfer in from: 74A Ashford    
Steam L1 4-4-0 5w/e 11/12/1952 31789 Transfer in from: 74A Ashford    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 5w/e 11/12/1952 30133 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam German Engines 4-4-0 5w/e 11/12/1952 31774 Transfer out to: 74A Ashford    
Steam German Engines 4-4-0 5w/e 11/12/1952 31775 Transfer out to: 74A Ashford    
Steam German Engines 4-4-0 5w/e 11/12/1952 31776 Transfer out to: 74A Ashford    
Steam German Engines 4-4-0 5w/e 11/12/1952 31777 Transfer out to: 74A Ashford    
Steam German Engines 4-4-0 5w/e 11/12/1952 31778 Transfer out to: 74A Ashford    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 m/e 01/1953 76006 1st Allocation        
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 m/e 01/1953 76007 1st Allocation        
Steam L1 4-4-0 4w/e 08/01/1953 31785 Transfer out to: 74A Ashford    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 m/e 02/1953 76008 1st Allocation        
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 m/e 02/1953 76009 1st Allocation        
Steam O2 0-4-4T m/e 02/1953 30213 Condemned      
Steam Jumbos 0-6-0 m/e 02/1953 30565 Condemned      
Diesel 12 0-6-0 5w/e 14/02/1953 15230 Transfer in from: 73C Hither Green    
Diesel 12 0-6-0 5w/e 14/02/1953 15231 Transfer in from:        
Diesel 12 0-6-0 5w/e 14/02/1953 15233 Transfer in from:        
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 5w/e 14/02/1953 30133 Transfer in from: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam P 0-6-0T 5w/e 14/02/1953 31558 Transfer in from: 73A Stewarts Lane    
Steam Black Tanks 0-6-0T 5w/e 14/02/1953 32113 Transfer in from: TON Tonbridge    
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 5w/e 14/02/1953 82012 Transfer in from: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam Z 0-8-0T 5w/e 14/02/1953 30952 Transfer out to: 74C Dover    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 5w/e 14/02/1953 31805 Transfer out to: 75B Redhill    
Steam Q1 0-6-0 5w/e 14/02/1953 33016 Transfer out to: 73E Faversham    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 m/e 03/1953 76010 1st Allocation        
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 m/e 03/1953 76011 1st Allocation        
Steam Jumbos 0-6-0 m/e 03/1953 30581 Condemned      
Steam Q1 0-6-0 6w/e 27/03/1953 33018 Transfer out to: 74B Ramsgate    
Steam Q1 0-6-0 6w/e 27/03/1953 33019 Transfer out to: 74B Ramsgate    
Steam Q1 0-6-0 6w/e 27/03/1953 33022 Transfer out to: 74B Ramsgate    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 m/e 04/1953 76012 1st Allocation        
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 m/e 04/1953 76013 1st Allocation        
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 m/e 05/1953 76014 1st Allocation        
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 m/e 05/1953 76015 1st Allocation        
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 m/e 05/1953 76016 1st Allocation        
Steam O2 0-4-4T 4w/e 26/05/1953 30177 Transfer in from: DOR Dorchester    
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 4w/e 26/05/1953 82014 Transfer in from: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 4w/e 26/05/1953 30749 Transfer out to: 70D Basingstoke    
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 4w/e 26/05/1953 82014 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 m/e 06/1953 76017 1st Allocation        
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 m/e 06/1953 76018 1st Allocation        
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 m/e 07/1953 76019 1st Allocation        
Diesel 12 0-6-0 8w/e 20/07/1953 15232 Transfer in from:        
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 8w/e 20/07/1953 30375 Transfer in from: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam D15 4-4-0 8w/e 20/07/1953 30464 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam D15 4-4-0 8w/e 20/07/1953 30465 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam Small Radials 0-6-2T 8w/e 20/07/1953 32453 Transfer out to: 73B Bricklayers Arms    
Steam Small Radials 0-6-2T 8w/e 20/07/1953 32460 Transfer out to: 73B Bricklayers Arms    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 8w/e 20/07/1953 76005 Transfer out to: 71B Bournemouth    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 8w/e 20/07/1953 76006 Transfer out to: 71B Bournemouth    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 5w/e 24/08/1953 31624 Transfer in from: 70C Guildford    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 5w/e 24/08/1953 31625 Transfer in from: 70C Guildford    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 5w/e 24/08/1953 31626 Transfer in from: 70C Guildford    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 m/e 10/1953 76025 1st Allocation        
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 m/e 10/1953 76026 1st Allocation        
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 m/e 10/1953 76027 1st Allocation        
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 m/e 10/1953 76028 1st Allocation        
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 4w/e 01/10/1953 30117 Transfer in from: 71C Dorchester    
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 4w/e 01/10/1953 30120 Transfer in from: 71C Dorchester    
Steam Z 0-8-0T 4w/e 01/10/1953 30952 Transfer in from: 74C Dover    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 4w/e 01/10/1953 31613 Transfer in from: 70E Reading (S.R.)    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 4w/e 01/10/1953 31620 Transfer in from: 73C Hither Green    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 4w/e 01/10/1953 31621 Transfer in from: 73C Hither Green    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 4w/e 01/10/1953 31801 Transfer in from: 73C Hither Green    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 4w/e 01/10/1953 76005 Transfer in from: 71B Bournemouth    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 4w/e 01/10/1953 76006 Transfer in from: 71B Bournemouth    
Steam B4 0-4-0T 4w/e 01/10/1953 30088 Transfer out to: 72D Plymouth Friary    
Steam D15 4-4-0 4w/e 01/10/1953 30471 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 4w/e 01/10/1953 31624 Transfer out to: 70C Guildford    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 4w/e 01/10/1953 31625 Transfer out to: 70C Guildford    
Steam E6 0-6-2T 4w/e 01/10/1953 32412 Transfer out to: 73B Bricklayers Arms    
Steam E6 0-6-2T 4w/e 01/10/1953 32413 Transfer out to: 75C Norwood Junction    
Steam E6 0-6-2T 4w/e 01/10/1953 32416 Transfer out to: 75C Norwood Junction    
Steam B4 0-4-0T 4w/e 29/10/1953 30083 Transfer in from: 72D Plymouth Friary    
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 4w/e 29/10/1953 30310 Transfer in from: 70C Guildford    
Steam Black Motors 0-6-0 4w/e 29/10/1953 30350 Transfer out to: 70C Guildford    
Steam Q1 0-6-0 4w/e 29/10/1953 33024 Transfer out to: 74D Tonbridge    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 m/e 11/1953 76029 1st Allocation        
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 4w/e 10/12/1953 30377 Transfer out to: 75B Redhill    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 4w/e 30/12/1953 31620 Transfer out to: 70C Guildford    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 m/e 01/1954 76005 Transfer out to: 75A Brighton    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 m/e 01/1954 76006 Transfer out to: 75A Brighton    
Steam O2 0-4-4T 4w/e 08/02/1954 30179 Transfer in from: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 4w/e 08/02/1954 30377 Transfer in from: 75B Redhill    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 8w/e 13/05/1954 13013 Transfer in from: 73C Hither Green    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 8w/e 13/05/1954 13014 Transfer in from: 73C Hither Green    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 8w/e 13/05/1954 31618 Transfer in from: 71C Dorchester    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 8w/e 13/05/1954 31619 Transfer in from: 70E Reading (S.R.)    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 8w/e 13/05/1954 31620 Transfer in from: 70C Guildford    
Steam O2 0-4-4T 8w/e 13/05/1954 30225 Transfer out to: 72D Plymouth Friary    
Steam P 0-6-0T 8w/e 13/05/1954 31558 Transfer out to: 75A Brighton    
Steam Q1 0-6-0 8w/e 13/05/1954 33017 Transfer out to: 75A Brighton    
Steam D15 4-4-0 6w/e 18/06/1954 30467 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam Z 0-8-0T 6w/e 18/06/1954 30952 Transfer out to: 74A Ashford    
Steam L1 4-4-0 6w/e 18/06/1954 31786 Transfer out to: 73B Bricklayers Arms    
Steam L1 4-4-0 6w/e 18/06/1954 31787 Transfer out to: 73B Bricklayers Arms    
Steam L1 4-4-0 6w/e 18/06/1954 31788 Transfer out to: 73B Bricklayers Arms    
Steam L1 4-4-0 6w/e 18/06/1954 31789 Transfer out to: 73B Bricklayers Arms    
Steam Q1 0-6-0 6w/e 18/06/1954 33025 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam Q1 0-6-0 6w/e 18/06/1954 33038 Transfer out to: 75C Norwood Junction    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 4w/e 20/08/1954 30130 Transfer in from: 9E Nine Elms    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 4w/e 20/08/1954 30133 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam Z 0-8-0T 4w/e 20/08/1954 30955 Transfer out to: 75A Brighton    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 06/11/1954 13010 Transfer in from: 73C Hither Green    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 06/11/1954 13011 Transfer in from: 73C Hither Green    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 06/11/1954 13012 Transfer in from: 73C Hither Green    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 06/11/1954 34040 Transfer in from: 71G Bath Green Park (S&D)    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 06/11/1954 34041 Transfer in from: 71B Bournemouth    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 06/11/1954 34042 Transfer in from: 71B Bournemouth    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 9w/e 08/02/1955 30324 Transfer in from: GFD Guildford    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 9w/e 08/02/1955 30328 Transfer in from: GFD Guildford    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 9w/e 08/02/1955 30356 Transfer in from: 71D Fratton    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 9w/e 08/02/1955 30127 Transfer out to: 71B Bournemouth    
Diesel 12 0-6-0 5w/e 11/03/1955 15234 Transfer in from: 73C Hither Green    
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 5w/e 11/03/1955 30707 Transfer in from: 72C Yeovil Town    
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 5w/e 11/03/1955 30727 Transfer in from: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 5w/e 11/03/1955 76005 Transfer in from: 71C Dorchester    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 5w/e 11/03/1955 76006 Transfer in from: 71C Dorchester    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 5w/e 11/03/1955 31626 Transfer out to: 72C Yeovil Town    
Diesel 12 0-6-0 6w/e 20/04/1955 15236 Transfer in from: 73C Hither Green    
Steam Black Motors 0-6-0 6w/e 20/04/1955 30700 Transfer out to: 70C Guildford    
Diesel 12 0-6-0 6w/e 21/06/1955 15235 Transfer in from: 73C Hither Green    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 6w/e 21/06/1955 31629 Transfer in from: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 6w/e 21/06/1955 31635 Transfer in from: 72B Salisbury    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 6w/e 21/06/1955 31636 Transfer in from: 72B Salisbury    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 6w/e 21/06/1955 31639 Transfer in from: 72B Salisbury    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 6w/e 21/06/1955 31802 Transfer in from: 73E Faversham    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 6w/e 21/06/1955 31803 Transfer in from: 73E Faversham    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 6w/e 21/06/1955 31804 Transfer in from: 73E Faversham    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 6w/e 21/06/1955 30031 Transfer out to: 75A Brighton    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 6w/e 21/06/1955 30328 Transfer out to: 71B Bournemouth    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 6w/e 21/06/1955 30379 Transfer out to: 75E Three Bridges    
Steam H15 4-6-0 6w/e 21/06/1955 30478 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 6w/e 21/06/1955 31621 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 6w/e 21/06/1955 76005 Transfer out to: 72B Salisbury    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 6w/e 21/06/1955 76006 Transfer out to: 72B Salisbury    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 6w/e 21/06/1955 76008 Transfer out to: 72B Salisbury    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 2w/e 07/07/1955 30764 Transfer in from: BAT Stewarts Lane    
Steam G6 0-6-0T 5w/e 12/08/1955 30162 Transfer in from: 71B Bournemouth    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 5w/e 12/08/1955 30764 Transfer out to: 71B Bournemouth    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 5w/e 16/09/1955 30791 Transfer in from: 73A Stewarts Lane    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 4w/e 10/10/1955 30749 Transfer in from: 70D Basingstoke    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 4w/e 10/10/1955 30750 Transfer in from: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 4w/e 10/10/1955 30755 Transfer in from: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 4w/e 10/10/1955 30795 Transfer in from: 73A Stewarts Lane    
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 4w/e 10/10/1955 30727 Transfer out to: 71B Bournemouth    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 4w/e 10/10/1955 30750 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 4w/e 10/10/1955 30755 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam Black Tanks 0-6-0T 4w/e 10/10/1955 32113 Transfer out to: 71I Southampton Docks    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 m/e 11/1955 30746 Condemned      
Steam D15 4-4-0 3w/e 01/11/1955 30465 Transfer in from: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 m/e 12/1955 30740 Condemned      
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 m/e 12/1955 30752 Condemned      
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 7w/e 19/12/1955 30379 Transfer in from: 75E Three Bridges    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 7w/e 19/12/1955 30324 Transfer out to: 71B Bournemouth    
Steam D15 4-4-0 m/e 01/1956 30465 Condemned      
Diesel 08 0-6-0 6w/e 27/01/1956 13046 Transfer in from: 75C Norwood Junction    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 6w/e 27/01/1956 30750 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 6w/e 27/01/1956 30755 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 6w/e 27/01/1956 30780 Transfer out to: 70D Basingstoke    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 m/e 02/1956 30741 Condemned      
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 6w/e 15/06/1956 30028 Transfer in from: 75E Three Bridges    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 6w/e 15/06/1956 30328 Transfer in from: 75E Three Bridges    
Steam 757 0-6-2T 6w/e 15/06/1956 30757 Transfer in from: PLY Plymouth Friary    
Steam 757 0-6-2T 6w/e 15/06/1956 30758 Transfer in from: PLY Plymouth Friary    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 6w/e 15/06/1956 30763 Transfer in from: 70D Basingstoke    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 6w/e 15/06/1956 30770 Transfer in from: 70D Basingstoke    
Steam Lord Nelson 4-6-0 6w/e 15/06/1956 30861 Transfer in from: 9E Nine Elms    
Steam Lord Nelson 4-6-0 6w/e 15/06/1956 30862 Transfer in from: 9E Nine Elms    
Steam Lord Nelson 4-6-0 6w/e 15/06/1956 30863 Transfer in from: 9E Nine Elms    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 6w/e 15/06/1956 75073 Transfer in from: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 6w/e 15/06/1956 75074 Transfer in from: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 6w/e 15/06/1956 30749 Transfer out to: 70D Basingstoke    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 6w/e 15/06/1956 30751 Transfer out to: 70D Basingstoke    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 6w/e 15/06/1956 30795 Transfer out to: 73A Stewarts Lane    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 6w/e 15/06/1956 31635 Transfer out to: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 6w/e 15/06/1956 31804 Transfer out to: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam Radials 0-6-2T 6w/e 15/06/1956 32562 Transfer out to: 75A Brighton    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 6w/e 15/06/1956 34040 Transfer out to: 71B Bournemouth    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 6w/e 15/06/1956 34041 Transfer out to: 71B Bournemouth    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 6w/e 15/06/1956 34042 Transfer out to: 71B Bournemouth    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 6w/e 15/06/1956 41304 Transfer out to: 74B Ramsgate    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 m/e 07/1956 76063 1st Allocation        
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 m/e 07/1956 76064 1st Allocation        
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 m/e 07/1956 76065 1st Allocation        
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 m/e 07/1956 76066 1st Allocation        
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 m/e 08/1956 76067 1st Allocation        
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 m/e 08/1956 76068 1st Allocation        
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 m/e 08/1956 76069 1st Allocation        
Steam G6 0-6-0T 7w/e 27/08/1956 30162 Transfer out to: 72D Plymouth Friary    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 7w/e 27/08/1956 31636 Transfer out to: 70C Guildford    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 7w/e 27/08/1956 76009 Transfer out to: 75B Redhill    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 7w/e 27/08/1956 76014 Transfer out to: 75B Redhill    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 9w/e 27/10/1956 73087 Transfer in from: 71G Bath Green Park (S&D)    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 9w/e 27/10/1956 73116 Transfer in from: 71G Bath Green Park (S&D)    
Steam O2 0-4-4T 3w/e 17/11/1956 30212 Transfer in from: 9E Nine Elms    
Steam O2 0-4-4T 3w/e 17/11/1956 30223 Transfer in from: 71B Bournemouth    
Steam Radials 0-6-2T 3w/e 17/11/1956 32491 Transfer in from: 70D Basingstoke    
Steam O2 0-4-4T 3w/e 17/11/1956 30177 Transfer out to: 70B Feltham    
Steam O2 0-4-4T 3w/e 17/11/1956 30179 Transfer out to: 70B Feltham    
Steam Black Motors 0-6-0 3w/e 17/11/1956 30306 Transfer out to: 71B Bournemouth    
Steam Black Tanks 0-6-0T 3w/e 17/11/1956 32151 Transfer out to: 71I Southampton Docks    
Steam 757 0-6-2T m/e 12/1956 30758 Condemned      
Steam E2 0-6-0T 4w/e 17/12/1956 32108 Transfer in from: DOV Dover    
Steam E2 0-6-0T 4w/e 17/12/1956 32109 Transfer in from: DOV Dover    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 6w/e 25/01/1957 76009 Transfer in from: 75B Redhill    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 6w/e 25/01/1957 76014 Transfer in from: 75B Redhill    
Steam E2 0-6-0T 6w/e 25/01/1957 32108 Transfer out to: 71I Southampton Docks    
Steam E2 0-6-0T 6w/e 25/01/1957 32109 Transfer out to: 71I Southampton Docks    
Steam Black Motors 0-6-0 6w/e 01/04/1957 30306 Transfer in from: 71B Bournemouth    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 6w/e 01/04/1957 75070 Transfer in from: 71G Bath Green Park (S&D)    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 6w/e 01/04/1957 75073 Transfer out to: 71G Bath Green Park (S&D)    
Steam Potato Cans 0-4-0T m/e 06/1957 30589 Condemned      
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 9w/e 12/06/1957 30792 Transfer in from: 73A Stewarts Lane    
Steam P 0-6-0T 9w/e 12/06/1957 31325 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 9w/e 12/06/1957 30748 Transfer out to: 70D Basingstoke    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 9w/e 12/06/1957 30763 Transfer out to: 71B Bournemouth    
Steam B4 0-4-0T m/e 07/1957 30082 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 5w/e 19/07/1957 73087 Transfer out to: 71G Bath Green Park (S&D)    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 5w/e 19/07/1957 73116 Transfer out to: 71G Bath Green Park (S&D)    
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 7w/e 08/10/1957 30310 Transfer out to: 71B Bournemouth    
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 7w/e 08/10/1957 30707 Transfer out to: 71B Bournemouth    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 7w/e 08/10/1957 75074 Transfer out to: 70D Basingstoke    
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 m/e 12/1957 30283 Condemned      
Steam Potato Cans 0-4-0T m/e 12/1957 30588 Condemned      
Steam 757 0-6-2T m/e 12/1957 30757 Condemned      
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 m/e 04/1958 30284 Condemned      
Steam Lord Nelson 4-6-0 q/e 06/06/1958 30858 Transfer in from: 9E Nine Elms    
Steam Lord Nelson 4-6-0 q/e 06/06/1958 30859 Transfer in from: 9E Nine Elms    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 4w/e 06/06/1958 76007 Transfer in from: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T q/e 06/06/1958 30130 Transfer out to: 70B Feltham    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T q/e 06/06/1958 30356 Transfer out to: 70F Fratton    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 4w/e 06/06/1958 76007 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 m/e 08/1958 30285 Condemned      
Steam B4 0-4-0T 3w/e 13/10/1958 30088 Transfer in from: 72D Plymouth Friary    
Steam B4 0-4-0T 3w/e 13/10/1958 30089 Transfer in from: 72D Plymouth Friary    
Steam B4 0-4-0T 3w/e 13/10/1958 30102 Transfer in from: ELH Eastleigh    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 3w/e 13/10/1958 31611 Transfer in from: 70F Fratton    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 3w/e 13/10/1958 31633 Transfer in from: BAS Basingstoke    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 3w/e 13/10/1958 31792 Transfer in from: YEO Yeovil Town    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 3w/e 13/10/1958 31793 Transfer in from: 72C Yeovil Town    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 3w/e 13/10/1958 31794 Transfer in from: 72C Yeovil Town    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 3w/e 13/10/1958 31795 Transfer in from: 70C Guildford    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 3w/e 13/10/1958 31796 Transfer in from: 70C Guildford    
Steam B4 0-4-0T 3w/e 13/10/1958 30102 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam P 0-6-0T 3w/e 13/10/1958 31325 Transfer out to: 75A Brighton    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 3w/e 13/10/1958 76007 Transfer out to: 72B Salisbury    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 3w/e 13/10/1958 76009 Transfer out to: 72C Yeovil Town    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 3w/e 13/10/1958 76010 Transfer out to: 72C Yeovil Town    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 3w/e 13/10/1958 76011 Transfer out to: 72C Yeovil Town    
Steam B4 0-4-0T m/e 12/1958 30087 Condemned      
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T m/e 01/1959 30376 Condemned      
Steam Jumbos 0-6-0 m/e 02/1959 30566 Condemned      
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 m/e 02/1959 30787 Condemned      
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 m/e 02/1959 30792 Condemned      
Diesel 09 0-6-0 02/02/1959 D3665 1st Allocation        
Diesel 09 0-6-0 03/02/1959 D3666 1st Allocation        
Diesel 09 0-6-0 17/02/1959 D3668 1st Allocation        
Diesel 09 0-6-0 19/02/1959 D3667 1st Allocation        
Diesel 04 0-6-0 w/e 11/03/1959 11222 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Diesel 04 0-6-0 w/e 11/03/1959 11224 Transfer in from: 73C Hither Green    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T w/e 11/03/1959 30130 Transfer in from: 70B Feltham    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 w/e 11/03/1959 31808 Transfer in from: 71D Fratton    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 w/e 11/03/1959 76010 Transfer in from: 72C Yeovil Town    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 w/e 11/03/1959 76011 Transfer in from: 72C Yeovil Town    
Steam B4 0-4-0T w/e 11/03/1959 30089 Transfer out to: 70C Guildford    
Steam B4 0-4-0T w/e 11/03/1959 30102 Transfer out to: 71B Bournemouth    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 w/e 11/03/1959 31611 Transfer out to: 70D Basingstoke    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 w/e 11/03/1959 31613 Transfer out to: 72C Yeovil Town    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 w/e 11/03/1959 31633 Transfer out to: 72C Yeovil Town    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 11/03/1959 75070 Transfer out to: 75A Brighton    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 03/04/1959 D2085 1st Allocation        
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T m/e 05/1959 30481 Condemned      
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 3w/e 01/05/1959 30773 Transfer in from: 70D Basingstoke    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 3w/e 01/05/1959 31796 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 6w/e 14/06/1959 30052 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 6w/e 14/06/1959 30053 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 6w/e 14/06/1959 30055 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 6w/e 14/06/1959 30056 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 6w/e 14/06/1959 30109 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 6w/e 14/06/1959 30110 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 6w/e 14/06/1959 30732 Transfer in from: 71D Fratton    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 6w/e 14/06/1959 30767 Transfer in from:        
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 6w/e 14/06/1959 30768 Transfer in from: 73A Stewarts Lane    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 6w/e 14/06/1959 30769 Transfer in from: 73A Stewarts Lane    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 6w/e 14/06/1959 30800 Transfer in from: 73B Bricklayers Arms    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 6w/e 14/06/1959 30802 Transfer in from: 73A Stewarts Lane    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 6w/e 14/06/1959 30803 Transfer in from: 73A Stewarts Lane    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 6w/e 14/06/1959 30804 Transfer in from: 74C Dover    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 6w/e 14/06/1959 30805 Transfer in from: 74C Dover    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 6w/e 14/06/1959 30806 Transfer in from: 73C Hither Green    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 6w/e 14/06/1959 31632 Transfer in from: 71B Bournemouth    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 6w/e 14/06/1959 76061 Transfer in from: 75B Redhill    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 6w/e 14/06/1959 76062 Transfer in from: 75B Redhill    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 6w/e 14/06/1959 30375 Transfer out to: 72E Barnstaple Junction    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 6w/e 14/06/1959 30377 Transfer out to: 70F Fratton    
Steam B4 0-4-0T m/e 07/1959 30088 Condemned      
Steam H15 4-6-0 m/e 07/1959 30473 Condemned      
Steam H15 4-6-0 m/e 07/1959 30477 Condemned      
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 5w/e 18/07/1959 41319 Transfer in from: 75F Tunbridge Wells West    
Steam D1 4-4-0 4w/e 19/08/1959 31735 Transfer in from: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T m/e 10/1959 30030 Condemned      
Steam B4 0-4-0T m/e 10/1959 30083 Condemned      
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 m/e 10/1959 30732 Condemned      
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 m/e 10/1959 30784 Condemned      
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 m/e 10/1959 30785 Condemned      
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 6w/e 22/10/1959 30056 Transfer out to: 75A Brighton    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 6w/e 22/10/1959 30110 Transfer out to: 75A Brighton    
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 m/e 11/1959 30289 Condemned      
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 m/e 11/1959 30805 Condemned      
Diesel 12 0-6-0 5w/e 26/11/1959 15214 Transfer in from: NORW Norwood Junction    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 5w/e 26/11/1959 30039 Transfer in from: 70F Fratton    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 5w/e 26/11/1959 30357 Transfer in from: 71D Fratton    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 5w/e 26/11/1959 30375 Transfer in from: 72E Barnstaple Junction    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 5w/e 26/11/1959 30377 Transfer in from: 70F Fratton    
Steam Lord Nelson 4-6-0 5w/e 26/11/1959 30860 Transfer in from: 71B Bournemouth    
Steam Lord Nelson 4-6-0 5w/e 26/11/1959 30864 Transfer in from: 71B Bournemouth    
Steam Lord Nelson 4-6-0 5w/e 26/11/1959 30865 Transfer in from: 71B Bournemouth    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 5w/e 26/11/1959 31804 Transfer in from: 70F Fratton    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 5w/e 26/11/1959 31809 Transfer in from: EXJ Exmouth Junction    
Steam Terriers 0-6-0T 5w/e 26/11/1959 32636 Transfer in from: 70F Fratton    
Steam Terriers 0-6-0T 5w/e 26/11/1959 32640 Transfer in from: 70F Fratton    
Steam Terriers 0-6-0T 5w/e 26/11/1959 32646 Transfer in from: 70F Fratton    
Steam Terriers 0-6-0T 5w/e 26/11/1959 32650 Transfer in from: 71D Fratton    
Steam Terriers 0-6-0T 5w/e 26/11/1959 32661 Transfer in from: FRA Fratton    
Steam Terriers 0-6-0T 5w/e 26/11/1959 32678 Transfer in from: 70F Fratton    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 5w/e 26/11/1959 76056 Transfer in from: 75B Redhill    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 5w/e 26/11/1959 76057 Transfer in from: 75B Redhill    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 5w/e 26/11/1959 76058 Transfer in from: 75B Redhill    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 5w/e 26/11/1959 30052 Transfer out to: 75E Three Bridges    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 5w/e 26/11/1959 30055 Transfer out to: 75E Three Bridges    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 5w/e 26/11/1959 30109 Transfer out to: 75E Three Bridges    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T m/e 12/1959 30130 Condemned      
Steam O2 0-4-4T m/e 12/1959 30212 Condemned      
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 m/e 12/1959 30789 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 5w/e 31/12/1959 76056 Transfer out to: 71B Bournemouth    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 5w/e 31/12/1959 76057 Transfer out to: 71B Bournemouth    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 5w/e 31/12/1959 76058 Transfer out to: 71B Bournemouth    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 m/e 02/1960 30769 Condemned      
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 6w/e 09/02/1960 30035 Transfer in from: PLY Plymouth Friary    
Steam H16 4-6-2T 6w/e 09/02/1960 30516 Transfer in from: FEL Feltham    
Steam H16 4-6-2T 6w/e 09/02/1960 30517 Transfer in from: FEL Feltham    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 6w/e 09/02/1960 41311 Transfer in from: 73F Ashford    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 4w/e 10/03/1960 31613 Transfer in from: 72C Yeovil Town    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 4w/e 10/03/1960 31626 Transfer in from: 72C Yeovil Town    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 4w/e 10/03/1960 31791 Transfer in from: 72C Yeovil Town    
Steam Terriers 0-6-0T 4w/e 10/03/1960 32655 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 4w/e 10/03/1960 76006 Transfer in from: 72B Salisbury    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 4w/e 10/03/1960 76009 Transfer in from: 72B Salisbury    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 4w/e 10/03/1960 76059 Transfer in from: 72B Salisbury    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 4w/e 10/03/1960 76060 Transfer in from: 72B Salisbury    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 4w/e 10/03/1960 30053 Transfer out to: 75A Brighton    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 4w/e 10/03/1960 30328 Transfer out to: 73J Tonbridge    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 4w/e 10/03/1960 30379 Transfer out to: 73J Tonbridge    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 4w/e 10/03/1960 31632 Transfer out to: 72C Yeovil Town    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 4w/e 10/03/1960 31792 Transfer out to: 72C Yeovil Town    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 4w/e 10/03/1960 31802 Transfer out to: 72C Yeovil Town    
Steam Terriers 0-6-0T 4w/e 10/03/1960 32636 Transfer out to: 75A Brighton    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 4w/e 10/03/1960 76017 Transfer out to: 72B Salisbury    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 4w/e 10/03/1960 76018 Transfer out to: 72B Salisbury    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 4w/e 10/03/1960 76066 Transfer out to: 72B Salisbury    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 4w/e 10/03/1960 76067 Transfer out to: 72B Salisbury    
Steam H15 4-6-0 m/e 04/1960 30474 Condemned      
Diesel 12 0-6-0 4w/e 05/04/1960 15230 Transfer in from: 82B St Philips Marsh    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 4w/e 05/04/1960 30133 Transfer in from: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 4w/e 05/04/1960 30357 Transfer in from: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 4w/e 05/04/1960 30375 Transfer in from: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 4w/e 05/04/1960 30377 Transfer in from: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 05/04/1960 41319 Transfer in from: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 4w/e 05/04/1960 76062 Transfer in from: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 4w/e 05/04/1960 30039 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 4w/e 05/04/1960 30357 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 4w/e 05/04/1960 30375 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 4w/e 05/04/1960 30377 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 05/04/1960 41319 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 4w/e 05/04/1960 76062 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Diesel 04 0-6-0 29/04/1960 D2289 1st Allocation        
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 m/e 05/1960 30791 Condemned      
Steam Terriers 0-6-0T m/e 05/1960 32655 Condemned      
Diesel 04 0-6-0 15/05/1960 D2291 1st Allocation        
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 6w/e 05/10/1960 30125 Transfer out to: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 m/e 12/1960 30288 Condemned      
Steam Radials 0-6-2T m/e 01/1961 32491 Condemned      
Steam E2 0-6-0T 8w/e 17/01/1961 32104 Transfer in from: 75C Norwood Junction    
Steam E2 0-6-0T 8w/e 17/01/1961 32105 Transfer in from: 75C Norwood Junction    
Steam Radials 0-6-2T 8w/e 17/01/1961 32506 Transfer in from: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam Radials 0-6-2T 8w/e 17/01/1961 32563 Transfer in from: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam Standard Class 9 2-10-0 8w/e 17/01/1961 92205 Transfer in from: 82D Westbury    
Steam Standard Class 9 2-10-0 8w/e 17/01/1961 92206 Transfer in from: 82D Westbury    
Steam Standard Class 9 2-10-0 8w/e 17/01/1961 92231 Transfer in from: 82E Bristol Barrow Road    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 8w/e 17/01/1961 30035 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam H16 4-6-2T m/e 10/02/1961 30518 Transfer in from: FEL Feltham    
Steam H16 4-6-2T m/e 10/02/1961 30519 Transfer in from: FEL Feltham    
Steam H16 4-6-2T m/e 10/02/1961 30520 Transfer in from: FEL Feltham    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 m/e 10/02/1961 31908 Transfer in from: 74D Tonbridge    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 m/e 10/02/1961 31909 Transfer in from: 74D Tonbridge    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 m/e 10/02/1961 31910 Transfer in from: 74D Tonbridge    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T m/e 10/02/1961 41305 Transfer out to: 75A Brighton    
Steam O2 0-4-4T m/e 03/1961 30229 Condemned      
Steam O2 0-4-4T 5w/e 18/03/1961 30200 Transfer in from: WAD Wadebridge    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 5w/e 18/03/1961 41305 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 5w/e 18/03/1961 73041 Transfer in from: 71G Weymouth Radipole (GWR)    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 5w/e 18/03/1961 73042 Transfer in from: 71G Weymouth Radipole (GWR)    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 5w/e 18/03/1961 73080 Transfer in from: 71G Weymouth Radipole (GWR)    
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 5w/e 18/03/1961 30120 Transfer out to: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam H16 4-6-2T 5w/e 18/03/1961 30519 Transfer out to: 70B Feltham    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 5w/e 18/03/1961 31908 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 5w/e 18/03/1961 31909 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 5w/e 18/03/1961 31910 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T m/e 04/1961 30357 Condemned      
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T m/e 04/1961 30479 Condemned      
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 m/e 04/1961 30806 Condemned      
Steam D1 4-4-0 m/e 04/1961 31735 Condemned      
Steam Lord Nelson 4-6-0 m/e 05/1961 30865 Condemned      
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 7w/e 03/05/1961 30050 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 7w/e 03/05/1961 30328 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 7w/e 03/05/1961 30379 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 7w/e 03/05/1961 73041 Transfer out to: 71G Weymouth Radipole (GWR)    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 7w/e 03/05/1961 73042 Transfer out to: 71G Weymouth Radipole (GWR)    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 7w/e 03/05/1961 73080 Transfer out to: 71G Weymouth Radipole (GWR)    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 3w/e 26/05/1961 31413 Transfer in from: 73H Dover    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 3w/e 26/05/1961 31810 Transfer in from: 73H Dover    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 3w/e 26/05/1961 31816 Transfer in from: 73C Hither Green    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 3w/e 26/05/1961 31818 Transfer in from: 73J Tonbridge    
Steam W 2-6-4T 3w/e 26/05/1961 31911 Transfer in from: HIT Hither Green    
Steam W 2-6-4T 3w/e 26/05/1961 31912 Transfer in from: 73C Hither Green    
Steam W 2-6-4T 3w/e 26/05/1961 31913 Transfer in from: HIT Hither Green    
Steam W 2-6-4T 3w/e 26/05/1961 31916 Transfer in from: 73C Hither Green    
Steam W 2-6-4T 3w/e 26/05/1961 31922 Transfer in from: HIT Hither Green    
Steam Q1 0-6-0 3w/e 26/05/1961 33037 Transfer in from: 73J Tonbridge    
Steam Q1 0-6-0 3w/e 26/05/1961 33039 Transfer in from: 73J Tonbridge    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 3w/e 26/05/1961 34004 Transfer in from: 73A Stewarts Lane    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 3w/e 26/05/1961 34016 Transfer in from: 73B Bricklayers Arms    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 3w/e 26/05/1961 34022 Transfer in from: 73B Bricklayers Arms    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 3w/e 26/05/1961 34025 Transfer in from: 73B Bricklayers Arms    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 3w/e 26/05/1961 75068 Transfer in from: 71B Bournemouth    
Steam Standard Class 2 Tank 2-6-2T 3w/e 26/05/1961 84028 Transfer in from: 73F Ashford    
Steam Standard Class 2 Tank 2-6-2T 3w/e 26/05/1961 84029 Transfer in from: 73F Ashford    
Steam H16 4-6-2T 3w/e 26/05/1961 30516 Transfer out to: 70B Feltham    
Steam H16 4-6-2T 3w/e 26/05/1961 30517 Transfer out to: 70B Feltham    
Steam H16 4-6-2T 3w/e 26/05/1961 30518 Transfer out to: 70B Feltham    
Steam H16 4-6-2T 3w/e 26/05/1961 30520 Transfer out to: 70B Feltham    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 3w/e 26/05/1961 76025 Transfer out to: 71B Bournemouth    
Steam Radials 0-6-2T m/e 06/1961 32506 Condemned      
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 m/e 07/1961 30117 Condemned      
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 m/e 07/1961 30802 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 5w/e 06/07/1961 75066 Transfer in from: 71B Bournemouth    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 5w/e 06/07/1961 30050 Transfer out to: 71B Bournemouth    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 5w/e 06/07/1961 30328 Transfer out to: 71B Bournemouth    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 5w/e 06/07/1961 30379 Transfer out to: 71B Bournemouth    
Steam Q 0-6-0 5w/e 06/07/1961 30535 Transfer out to: 75A Brighton    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 5w/e 06/07/1961 76015 Transfer out to: 71B Bournemouth    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 m/e 08/1961 30800 Condemned      
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 m/e 08/1961 30803 Condemned      
Steam Lord Nelson 4-6-0 m/e 08/1961 30858 Condemned      
Steam Radials 0-6-2T m/e 08/1961 32563 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 7w/e 23/08/1961 75065 Transfer in from: 71B Bournemouth    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 7w/e 23/08/1961 75067 Transfer in from: 71B Bournemouth    
Steam Standard Class 9 2-10-0 7w/e 23/08/1961 92211 Transfer in from: 82D Westbury    
Steam Standard Class 9 2-10-0 7w/e 23/08/1961 92239 Transfer in from: 82D Westbury    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 7w/e 23/08/1961 76019 Transfer out to: 71B Bournemouth    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 7w/e 23/08/1961 76026 Transfer out to: 71B Bournemouth    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T w/e 16/09/1961 41328 Transfer in from: 27C Southport    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T w/e 16/09/1961 41329 Transfer in from: 14E Bedford    
Steam Standard Class 2 Tank 2-6-2T w/e 16/09/1961 84028 Transfer out to: 24G Skipton    
Steam Standard Class 2 Tank 2-6-2T w/e 16/09/1961 84029 Transfer out to: 14E Bedford    
Steam O2 0-4-4T m/e 10/1961 30223 Condemned      
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 m/e 10/1961 30768 Condemned      
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 m/e 10/1961 30790 Condemned      
Diesel 04 0-6-0 m/e 09/11/1961 D2291 Transfer in from: 73C Hither Green    
Steam B4 0-4-0T m/e 09/11/1961 30102 Transfer in from: 71B Bournemouth    
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 m/e 09/11/1961 30120 Transfer in from: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam O2 0-4-4T m/e 09/11/1961 30199 Transfer in from: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam Black Motors 0-6-0 m/e 09/11/1961 30695 Transfer in from: BM Bournemouth    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 m/e 09/11/1961 34034 Transfer in from: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 m/e 09/11/1961 34038 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 m/e 09/11/1961 34061 Transfer in from: 73F Ashford    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 m/e 09/11/1961 34104 Transfer in from: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam E2 0-6-0T m/e 08/12/1961 32105 Transfer out to: 71I Southampton Docks    
Steam H15 4-6-0 w/e 09/12/1961 30476 Condemned      
Steam Lord Nelson 4-6-0 w/e 09/12/1961 30859 Condemned      
Steam Lord Nelson 4-6-0 w/e 27/01/1962 30864 Condemned      
Steam O2 0-4-4T 4w/e 02/1962 30225 Transfer in from: 72D Plymouth Friary    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 4w/e 01/02/1962 D2083 Transfer in from: 73F Ashford    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 4w/e 01/02/1962 31818 Transfer out to: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 w/e 10/02/1962 30773 Condemned      
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 w/e 10/02/1962 30788 Condemned      
Steam Lord Nelson 4-6-0 w/e 10/02/1962 30863 Condemned      
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 w/e 17/02/1962 30804 Condemned      
Diesel 12 0-6-0 4w/e 05/03/1962 15229 Transfer in from: 73F Ashford    
Diesel 04 0-6-0 4w/e 05/03/1962 D2292 Transfer in from: 71G Weymouth Radipole (GWR)    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 05/03/1962 D3014 Transfer in from: 75C Norwood Junction    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 4w/e 05/03/1962 76058 Transfer in from: 71B Bournemouth    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 4w/e 05/03/1962 76027 Transfer out to: 71B Bournemouth    
Steam O2 0-4-4T 4w/e 21/04/1962 30200 Transfer out to: 83H Plymouth Friary    
Steam Black Motors 0-6-0 w/e 21/04/1962 30306 Condemned      
Diesel 04 0-6-0 4w/e 01/05/1962 D2290 Transfer in from: 70C Guildford    
Steam E6 0-6-2T 4w/e 01/05/1962 32408 Transfer in from: 70B Feltham    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 28/05/1962 34097 Transfer in from: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 28/05/1962 34098 Transfer in from: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 5w/e 02/07/1962 30053 Transfer in from: 75E Three Bridges    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 5w/e 02/07/1962 80065 Transfer in from: 73J Tonbridge    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 5w/e 02/07/1962 80066 Transfer in from: 73J Tonbridge    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 5w/e 02/07/1962 80082 Transfer in from: 73B Bricklayers Arms    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 5w/e 02/07/1962 80083 Transfer in from: 73B Bricklayers Arms    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 5w/e 02/07/1962 31827 Transfer out to: 75D Stewarts Lane    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 4w/e 30/07/1962 30036 Transfer in from: 72D Plymouth Friary    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T m/e 08/1962 30377 Condemned      
Steam Lord Nelson 4-6-0 m/e 08/1962 30860 Condemned      
Steam Lord Nelson 4-6-0 18/08/1962 30850 Condemned      
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 4w/e 27/08/1962 D6504 Transfer in from: 73C Hither Green    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 4w/e 27/08/1962 D6505 Transfer in from: 73C Hither Green    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 4w/e 27/08/1962 D6506 Transfer in from: 73C Hither Green    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 4w/e 27/08/1962 D6508 Transfer in from: 73C Hither Green    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 4w/e 27/08/1962 D6530 Transfer in from: 73C Hither Green    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 4w/e 27/08/1962 D6533 Transfer in from: 73C Hither Green    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 4w/e 27/08/1962 D6536 Transfer in from: 73C Hither Green    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 4w/e 27/08/1962 D6546 Transfer in from: 73C Hither Green    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 4w/e 27/08/1962 D6549 Transfer in from: 73C Hither Green    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 4w/e 27/08/1962 D6556 Transfer in from: 73C Hither Green    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 4w/e 27/08/1962 D6583 Transfer in from: 73C Hither Green    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 4w/e 27/08/1962 D6585 Transfer in from: 73C Hither Green    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T m/e 09/1962 30375 Condemned      
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 24/09/1962 34008 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 24/09/1962 34021 Transfer in from: 71B Bournemouth    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 24/09/1962 34028 Transfer in from: 71B Bournemouth    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 24/09/1962 34037 Transfer in from: 71B Bournemouth    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 24/09/1962 34039 Transfer in from: 71B Bournemouth    
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 4w/e 24/09/1962 82010 Transfer in from: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 4w/e 24/09/1962 82011 Transfer in from: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 4w/e 24/09/1962 82013 Transfer in from: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 4w/e 24/09/1962 82017 Transfer in from: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 4w/e 24/09/1962 82018 Transfer in from: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 4w/e 24/09/1962 82019 Transfer in from: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 4w/e 24/09/1962 82022 Transfer in from: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 4w/e 24/09/1962 82023 Transfer in from: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 4w/e 24/09/1962 82024 Transfer in from: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 4w/e 24/09/1962 82025 Transfer in from: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 4w/e 24/09/1962 30770 Transfer out to: 70D Basingstoke    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T w/e 29/09/1962 30028 Condemned      
Steam Radials 0-6-2T w/e 29/09/1962 32510 Condemned      
Steam Lord Nelson 4-6-0 w/e 06/10/1962 30861 Condemned      
Steam Lord Nelson 4-6-0 w/e 06/10/1962 30862 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 w/e 08/12/1962 73002 Transfer in from: 41D Canklow    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 w/e 08/12/1962 73016 Transfer in from: 41D Canklow    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 w/e 08/12/1962 73043 Transfer in from: 41D Canklow    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 w/e 08/12/1962 73065 Transfer in from: 41D Canklow    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 w/e 08/12/1962 73155 Transfer in from: 41D Canklow    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 4w/e 17/12/1962 80087 Transfer in from: 75E Three Bridges    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 4w/e 17/12/1962 80095 Transfer in from: 75F Tunbridge Wells West    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 4w/e 17/12/1962 80137 Transfer in from: 75F Tunbridge Wells West    
Steam Standard Class 9 2-10-0 4w/e 17/12/1962 92211 Transfer in from: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam Standard Class 9 2-10-0 4w/e 17/12/1962 92239 Transfer in from: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam Q 0-6-0 4w/e 17/12/1962 30530 Transfer out to: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam Q 0-6-0 4w/e 17/12/1962 30531 Transfer out to: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam Q 0-6-0 4w/e 17/12/1962 30532 Transfer out to: 72B Salisbury    
Steam Q 0-6-0 4w/e 17/12/1962 30542 Transfer out to: 70C Guildford    
Steam Q 0-6-0 4w/e 17/12/1962 30543 Transfer out to: 75D Stewarts Lane    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 4w/e 17/12/1962 31613 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 4w/e 17/12/1962 31618 Transfer out to: 70D Basingstoke    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 4w/e 17/12/1962 75065 Transfer out to: 70D Basingstoke    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 4w/e 17/12/1962 75066 Transfer out to: 70D Basingstoke    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 4w/e 17/12/1962 75067 Transfer out to: 75A Brighton    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 4w/e 17/12/1962 75068 Transfer out to: 75A Brighton    
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 4w/e 17/12/1962 82012 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 4w/e 17/12/1962 82014 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 4w/e 17/12/1962 82015 Transfer out to: 70C Guildford    
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 4w/e 17/12/1962 82016 Transfer out to: 70C Guildford    
Steam Standard Class 9 2-10-0 4w/e 17/12/1962 92211 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam Standard Class 9 2-10-0 4w/e 17/12/1962 92239 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam O2 0-4-4T 23/12/1962 30199 Condemned      
Steam O2 0-4-4T 23/12/1962 30225 Condemned      
Steam Black Motors 0-6-0 23/12/1962 30316 Condemned      
Steam Black Motors 0-6-0 23/12/1962 30695 Condemned      
Steam E6 0-6-2T 23/12/1962 32408 Condemned      
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T w/e 29/12/1962 41210 Transfer in from: 8B Warrington Dallam    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T w/e 29/12/1962 41213 Transfer in from: 8B Warrington Dallam    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T w/e 05/01/1963 41224 Transfer in from: 15A Wellingborough    
Steam Q 0-6-0 3w/e 30/01/1963 30548 Transfer in from: 75E Three Bridges    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 3w/e 30/01/1963 30029 Transfer out to: 75F Tunbridge Wells West    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 3w/e 30/01/1963 30036 Transfer out to: 71B Bournemouth    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 3w/e 30/01/1963 30053 Transfer out to: 75F Tunbridge Wells West    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 3w/e 30/01/1963 30133 Transfer out to: 75F Tunbridge Wells West    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 3w/e 30/01/1963 30480 Transfer out to: 71B Bournemouth    
Steam Q 0-6-0 3w/e 30/01/1963 30536 Transfer out to: 75E Three Bridges    
Steam W 2-6-4T 3w/e 30/01/1963 31913 Transfer out to: 75C Norwood Junction    
Steam E2 0-6-0T m/e 04/1963 32104 Condemned      
Steam Terriers 0-6-0T m/e 04/1963 32661 Condemned      
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 4w/e 01/04/1963 30032 Transfer in from: 70B Feltham    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 4w/e 01/04/1963 30241 Transfer in from: 72B Salisbury    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 4w/e 01/04/1963 30249 Transfer in from: 70E Salisbury    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 4w/e 01/04/1963 30251 Transfer in from: 70B Feltham    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 01/04/1963 41297 Transfer in from: 72E Barnstaple Junction    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 01/04/1963 41298 Transfer in from: 72E Barnstaple Junction    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 01/04/1963 41310 Transfer in from: 72E Barnstaple Junction    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 4w/e 01/04/1963 75065 Transfer in from: 70D Basingstoke    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 4w/e 01/04/1963 75066 Transfer in from: 70D Basingstoke    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 4w/e 01/04/1963 75079 Transfer in from: 70D Basingstoke    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 4w/e 01/04/1963 80087 Transfer out to: 70C Guildford    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 4w/e 01/04/1963 80095 Transfer out to: 70C Guildford    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 4w/e 01/04/1963 80137 Transfer out to: 70C Guildford    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 06/04/1963 41210 Transfer out to: 72E Barnstaple Junction    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 06/04/1963 41213 Transfer out to: 72E Barnstaple Junction    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 06/04/1963 41224 Transfer out to: 72E Barnstaple Junction    
Steam Terriers 0-6-0T 4w/e 27/05/1963 32636 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Steam Terriers 0-6-0T 4w/e 27/05/1963 32662 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Steam Terriers 0-6-0T 4w/e 27/05/1963 32670 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Steam Terriers 0-6-0T 4w/e 27/05/1963 32640 Transfer out to: 75A Brighton    
Steam Terriers 0-6-0T 4w/e 27/05/1963 32678 Transfer out to: 75A Brighton    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 m/e 06/1963 31794 Condemned      
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 m/e 06/1963 31795 Condemned      
Steam USA 0-6-0T 4w/e 24/06/1963 30064 Transfer in from: SOT Southampton Docks    
Steam USA 0-6-0T 4w/e 24/06/1963 30067 Transfer in from: SOT Southampton Docks    
Steam USA 0-6-0T 4w/e 24/06/1963 30068 Transfer in from: SOT Southampton Docks    
Steam USA 0-6-0T 4w/e 24/06/1963 30069 Transfer in from: ELH Eastleigh    
Steam USA 0-6-0T 4w/e 24/06/1963 30071 Transfer in from: SOT Southampton Docks    
Steam USA 0-6-0T 4w/e 24/06/1963 30073 Transfer in from: SOT Southampton Docks    
Steam USA 0-6-0T 4w/e 24/06/1963 30069 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam Standard Class 9 2-10-0 4w/e 24/06/1963 92205 Transfer out to: 70B Feltham    
Steam Standard Class 9 2-10-0 4w/e 24/06/1963 92206 Transfer out to: 70B Feltham    
Steam Standard Class 9 2-10-0 4w/e 24/06/1963 92211 Transfer out to: 70B Feltham    
Steam Standard Class 9 2-10-0 4w/e 24/06/1963 92231 Transfer out to: 70B Feltham    
Steam Standard Class 9 2-10-0 4w/e 24/06/1963 92239 Transfer out to: 70B Feltham    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T m/e 07/1963 30032 Condemned      
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 m/e 07/1963 30120 Condemned      
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T m/e 07/1963 30241 Condemned      
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T m/e 07/1963 30249 Condemned      
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T m/e 07/1963 30251 Condemned      
Steam W 2-6-4T m/e 07/1963 31916 Condemned      
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 4w/e 22/07/1963 D6512 Transfer in from: 73C Hither Green    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 4w/e 22/07/1963 D6520 Transfer in from: 73C Hither Green    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 4w/e 22/07/1963 D6521 Transfer in from: 73C Hither Green    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 4w/e 22/07/1963 D6523 Transfer in from: 73C Hither Green    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 4w/e 22/07/1963 D6524 Transfer in from: 73C Hither Green    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 4w/e 22/07/1963 D6525 Transfer in from: 73C Hither Green    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 4w/e 22/07/1963 D6526 Transfer in from: 73C Hither Green    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 4w/e 22/07/1963 D6527 Transfer in from: 73C Hither Green    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 4w/e 22/07/1963 D6534 Transfer in from: 73C Hither Green    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 4w/e 22/07/1963 D6537 Transfer in from: 73C Hither Green    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 4w/e 22/07/1963 D6578 Transfer in from: 73C Hither Green    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 4w/e 22/07/1963 31816 Transfer out to: 71G Weymouth Radipole (GWR)    
Steam W 2-6-4T m/e 08/1963 31922 Condemned      
Steam Q1 0-6-0 m/e 08/1963 33021 Condemned      
Diesel D3/12 0-6-0 4w/e 19/08/1963 15201 Transfer in from: 73C Hither Green    
Steam B4 0-4-0T m/e 09/1963 30102 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 4w/e 16/09/1963 80015 Transfer in from: 75F Tunbridge Wells West    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 4w/e 16/09/1963 80146 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 4w/e 16/09/1963 80150 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 4w/e 16/09/1963 31413 Transfer out to: 70C Guildford    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 4w/e 16/09/1963 31810 Transfer out to: 70C Guildford    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 16/09/1963 41293 Transfer out to: 71G Weymouth Radipole (GWR)    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 16/09/1963 41297 Transfer out to: 71G Weymouth Radipole (GWR)    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 16/09/1963 41298 Transfer out to: 71G Weymouth Radipole (GWR)    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 16/09/1963 41305 Transfer out to: 71G Weymouth Radipole (GWR)    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 16/09/1963 41310 Transfer out to: 71G Weymouth Radipole (GWR)    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 16/09/1963 41311 Transfer out to: 71G Weymouth Radipole (GWR)    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 4w/e 16/09/1963 73002 Transfer out to: 71G Weymouth Radipole (GWR)    
Steam W 2-6-4T 2w/e 28/09/1963 31912 Transfer out to: 75C Norwood Junction    
Steam B4 0-4-0T m/e 10/1963 30096 Condemned      
Steam W 2-6-4T m/e 10/1963 31911 Condemned      
Steam Q1 0-6-0 m/e 10/1963 33037 Condemned      
Diesel 04 0-6-0 4w/e 14/10/1963 D2274 Transfer in from: 70B Feltham    
Steam Terriers 0-6-0T m/e 11/1963 32636 Condemned      
Steam Terriers 0-6-0T m/e 11/1963 32646 Condemned      
Steam Terriers 0-6-0T m/e 11/1963 32650 Condemned      
Steam Terriers 0-6-0T m/e 11/1963 32662 Condemned      
Steam Terriers 0-6-0T m/e 11/1963 32670 Condemned      
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 02/11/1963 34061 Transfer out to: 83D Exmouth Junction    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 m/e 11/11/1963 34058 Transfer in from: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 m/e 01/1964 31626 Condemned      
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 m/e 01/1964 31629 Condemned      
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 m/e 01/1964 31808 Condemned      
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 m/e 06/01/1964 34017 Transfer in from: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 m/e 06/01/1964 34018 Transfer in from: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 m/e 06/01/1964 34064 Transfer in from: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 m/e 06/01/1964 34073 Transfer in from: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 m/e 06/01/1964 75067 Transfer in from: 75C Norwood Junction    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 m/e 06/01/1964 75068 Transfer in from: 75C Norwood Junction    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 m/e 06/01/1964 75074 Transfer in from: 75C Norwood Junction    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 m/e 06/01/1964 75075 Transfer in from: 75C Norwood Junction    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 m/e 06/01/1964 31619 Transfer out to: 70C Guildford    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 m/e 06/01/1964 31620 Transfer out to: 70C Guildford    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 m/e 06/01/1964 31639 Transfer out to: 70C Guildford    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 m/e 06/01/1964 31791 Transfer out to: 70C Guildford    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 m/e 06/01/1964 31793 Transfer out to: 70C Guildford    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 m/e 06/01/1964 31801 Transfer out to: 70C Guildford    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 m/e 06/01/1964 73016 Transfer out to: 70B Feltham    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 m/e 06/01/1964 73043 Transfer out to: 70B Feltham    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 m/e 06/01/1964 73065 Transfer out to: 70B Feltham    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 m/e 06/01/1964 73155 Transfer out to: 70B Feltham    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T m/e 06/01/1964 80146 Transfer out to: 70F Bournemouth    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo m/e 27/01/1964 D6546 Transfer in from: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam USA 0-6-0T m/e 03/1964 30068 Condemned      
Diesel 04 0-6-0 4w/e 27/04/1964 D2285 Transfer in from: 70C Guildford    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 m/e 05/1964 34028 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 m/e 05/1964 76028 Condemned      
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 25/05/1964 41313 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 25/05/1964 41325 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 m/e 06/1964 31804 Condemned      
Steam Q1 0-6-0 m/e 06/1964 33023 Condemned      
Steam Q1 0-6-0 m/e 06/1964 33039 Condemned      
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 m/e 06/1964 34016 Condemned      
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 m/e 06/1964 34073 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 14/06/1964 82013 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 4w/e 22/06/1964 80014 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 4w/e 22/06/1964 80016 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 4w/e 22/06/1964 80017 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 4w/e 22/06/1964 31803 Transfer out to: 70C Guildford    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 4w/e 22/06/1964 31809 Transfer out to: 70C Guildford    
Steam Q1 0-6-0 4w/e 22/06/1964 33020 Transfer out to: 70B Feltham    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T m/e 07/1964 41328 Condemned      
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T m/e 07/1964 41329 Condemned      
Diesel 07 0-6-0 m/e 20/07/1964 D2985 Transfer in from: 71I Southampton Docks    
Diesel 07 0-6-0 m/e 20/07/1964 D2998 Transfer in from: 71I Southampton Docks    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 m/e 20/07/1964 34061 Transfer in from: 83D Exmouth Junction    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 m/e 20/07/1964 34072 Transfer in from: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 m/e 20/07/1964 34081 Transfer in from: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 m/e 08/1964 34061 Condemned      
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 m/e 08/1964 34081 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 09/08/1964 82025 Condemned      
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo m/e 17/08/1964 D6540 Transfer in from: 73C Hither Green    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo m/e 17/08/1964 D6541 Transfer in from: 73C Hither Green    
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 30/08/1964 82011 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 13/09/1964 80017 Condemned      
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 m/e 14/09/1964 34001 Transfer in from: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 m/e 14/09/1964 34002 Transfer in from: EXJ Exmouth Junction    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 m/e 14/09/1964 34009 Transfer in from: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 m/e 14/09/1964 34010 Transfer in from: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 m/e 14/09/1964 34023 Transfer in from: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 m/e 14/09/1964 34031 Transfer in from: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 m/e 14/09/1964 34033 Transfer in from: 72D Plymouth Friary    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 m/e 14/09/1964 34036 Transfer in from: 70E Salisbury    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 m/e 14/09/1964 34041 Transfer in from: 71B Bournemouth    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 m/e 14/09/1964 34042 Transfer in from: 71B Bournemouth    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 m/e 14/09/1964 34050 Transfer in from: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 m/e 14/09/1964 34060 Transfer in from: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 m/e 14/09/1964 34071 Transfer in from: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 m/e 14/09/1964 34076 Transfer in from: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 m/e 14/09/1964 34079 Transfer in from: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 m/e 14/09/1964 34082 Transfer in from: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 m/e 14/09/1964 34084 Transfer in from: 83D Exmouth Junction    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 m/e 14/09/1964 34086 Transfer in from: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 m/e 14/09/1964 34087 Transfer in from: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 m/e 14/09/1964 34088 Transfer in from: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 m/e 14/09/1964 34090 Transfer in from: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 m/e 14/09/1964 34093 Transfer in from: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 m/e 14/09/1964 34095 Transfer in from: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 m/e 14/09/1964 34101 Transfer in from: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 m/e 14/09/1964 34102 Transfer in from: 71B Bournemouth    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 m/e 14/09/1964 34103 Transfer in from: 71B Bournemouth    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 m/e 14/09/1964 34105 Transfer in from:        
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 m/e 14/09/1964 73029 Transfer in from: 71G Weymouth Radipole (GWR)    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 m/e 14/09/1964 73041 Transfer in from: 71G Weymouth Radipole (GWR)    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 m/e 14/09/1964 73043 Transfer in from: 70B Feltham    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 m/e 14/09/1964 73089 Transfer in from: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 m/e 14/09/1964 73110 Transfer in from: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 m/e 14/09/1964 73111 Transfer in from: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 m/e 14/09/1964 73112 Transfer in from: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 m/e 14/09/1964 73113 Transfer in from: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 m/e 14/09/1964 73114 Transfer in from: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 m/e 14/09/1964 73115 Transfer in from: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 m/e 14/09/1964 73116 Transfer in from: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 m/e 14/09/1964 73117 Transfer in from: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 m/e 14/09/1964 73118 Transfer in from: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 m/e 14/09/1964 73119 Transfer in from: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 m/e 14/09/1964 76018 Transfer in from: 72B Salisbury    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 m/e 14/09/1964 76019 Transfer in from: 71B Bournemouth    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 m/e 14/09/1964 75074 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 m/e 10/1964 34058 Condemned      
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 m/e 10/1964 34072 Condemned      
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 m/e 10/1964 34105 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 m/e 10/1964 75067 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 m/e 10/1964 76029 Condemned      
Diesel 03 0-6-0 m/e 12/10/1964 D2085 Transfer in from: 73C Hither Green    
Diesel 04 0-6-0 m/e 12/10/1964 D2251 Transfer in from: 73C Hither Green    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 m/e 12/10/1964 D3101 Transfer in from: 73C Hither Green    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 m/e 12/10/1964 73022 Transfer in from: 71G Weymouth Radipole (GWR)    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 m/e 12/10/1964 73087 Transfer in from: 70B Feltham    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 m/e 12/10/1964 73112 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 m/e 12/10/1964 76013 Transfer out to: 70F Bournemouth    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 m/e 12/10/1964 76014 Transfer out to: 70F Bournemouth    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 m/e 11/1964 73116 Condemned      
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 w/e 20/11/1964 34019 Transfer in from: 70B Feltham    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 w/e 20/11/1964 34077 Transfer in from: 70B Feltham    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo w/e 20/11/1964 D6504 Transfer in from: 73C Hither Green    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 w/e 20/11/1964 73155 Transfer in from: 70B Feltham    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 w/e 20/11/1964 73168 Transfer in from: 70B Feltham    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 w/e 20/11/1964 73169 Transfer in from: 70B Feltham    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 w/e 20/11/1964 73170 Transfer in from: 70B Feltham    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 w/e 20/11/1964 73171 Transfer in from: 70B Feltham    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T w/e 20/11/1964 80012 Transfer in from: 70B Feltham    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T w/e 20/11/1964 80018 Transfer in from: 70B Feltham    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 4w/e 21/12/1964 D6528 Transfer in from: 73C Hither Green    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 4w/e 21/12/1964 D6535 Transfer in from: 73C Hither Green    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 4w/e 21/12/1964 D6545 Transfer in from: 73C Hither Green    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 18/01/1965 D3040 Transfer in from: 70B Feltham    
Steam S15 4-6-0 4w/e 18/01/1965 30824 Transfer in from: 70B Feltham    
Steam S15 4-6-0 4w/e 18/01/1965 30833 Transfer in from: FEL Feltham    
Steam S15 4-6-0 4w/e 18/01/1965 30837 Transfer in from: 70B Feltham    
Steam S15 4-6-0 4w/e 18/01/1965 30838 Transfer in from: FEL Feltham    
Steam S15 4-6-0 4w/e 18/01/1965 30839 Transfer in from: FEL Feltham    
Steam S15 4-6-0 4w/e 18/01/1965 30842 Transfer in from: 70B Feltham    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 18/01/1965 D3226 Transfer in from: 75C Norwood Junction    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 4w/e 18/01/1965 D6532 Transfer in from: 73C Hither Green    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 4w/e 18/01/1965 D6544 Transfer in from: 73C Hither Green    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 4w/e 18/01/1965 D6548 Transfer in from: 73C Hither Green    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 4w/e 18/01/1965 76030 Transfer in from: 70C Guildford    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 4w/e 18/01/1965 76031 Transfer in from: 70C Guildford    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 4w/e 18/01/1965 76033 Transfer in from: 70C Guildford    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 18/01/1965 34001 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 18/01/1965 34002 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 18/01/1965 34021 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 18/01/1965 34038 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam S15 4-6-0 4w/e 18/01/1965 30824 Transfer out to: 70B Feltham    
Steam S15 4-6-0 4w/e 18/01/1965 30833 Transfer out to: 70B Feltham    
Steam S15 4-6-0 4w/e 18/01/1965 30837 Transfer out to: 70B Feltham    
Steam S15 4-6-0 4w/e 18/01/1965 30838 Transfer out to: 70B Feltham    
Steam S15 4-6-0 4w/e 18/01/1965 30839 Transfer out to: 70B Feltham    
Steam S15 4-6-0 4w/e 18/01/1965 30842 Transfer out to: 70B Feltham    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 m/e 02/1965 34031 Condemned      
Steam Q 0-6-0 m/e 03/1965 30548 Condemned      
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 m/e 03/1965 34010 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 4w/e 15/03/1965 80139 Transfer in from: 75B Redhill    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 m/e 04/1965 34022 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 m/e 04/1965 76030 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 2w/e 11/04/1965 73032 Transfer in from: 5E Nuneaton    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 2w/e 11/04/1965 73033 Transfer in from: 5E Nuneaton    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 2w/e 11/04/1965 73037 Transfer in from: 81F Oxford    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 11/04/1965 80018 Condemned      
Diesel 03 0-6-0 4w/e 12/04/1965 D2179 Transfer in from: 70B Feltham    
Diesel 04 0-6-0 4w/e 12/04/1965 D2294 Transfer in from: 70B Feltham    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 12/04/1965 D3042 Transfer in from: 70B Feltham    
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 24/04/1965 82010 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 25/04/1965 82017 Condemned      
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 m/e 05/1965 34039 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T w/e 01/05/1965 80070 Transfer in from: 89A Shrewsbury    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T w/e 01/05/1965 80102 Transfer in from: 6D Shrewsbury    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T w/e 01/05/1965 80132 Transfer in from: 6H Bangor    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 02/05/1965 80014 Condemned      
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 4w/e 10/05/1965 D6508 Transfer in from: 73C Hither Green    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 w/e 22/05/1965 73032 Transfer out to: 6C Croes Newydd    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T m/e 06/1965 41325 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 m/e 06/1965 73041 Condemned      
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 08/06/1965 D3093 Transfer in from: 70B Feltham    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 08/06/1965 41287 Transfer in from: 70C Guildford    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 08/06/1965 41294 Transfer in from: 70C Guildford    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 08/06/1965 41299 Transfer in from: 70C Guildford    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 4w/e 08/06/1965 75069 Transfer in from: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 4w/e 08/06/1965 75070 Transfer in from: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 4w/e 08/06/1965 75074 Transfer in from: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 4w/e 08/06/1965 75076 Transfer in from: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 4w/e 08/06/1965 75077 Transfer in from: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 4w/e 08/06/1965 75078 Transfer in from: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 4w/e 08/06/1965 80011 Transfer in from: 75B Redhill    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 4w/e 08/06/1965 73022 Transfer out to: 70C Guildford    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 4w/e 08/06/1965 73029 Transfer out to: 70C Guildford    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 4w/e 08/06/1965 73037 Transfer out to: 70C Guildford    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 4w/e 08/06/1965 73043 Transfer out to: 70C Guildford    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 4w/e 08/06/1965 73087 Transfer out to: 70C Guildford    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 13/06/1965 80066 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 20/06/1965 80070 Condemned      
Steam S15 4-6-0 4w/e 05/07/1965 30824 Transfer in from: 70B Feltham    
Steam S15 4-6-0 4w/e 05/07/1965 30842 Transfer in from: 70B Feltham    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 4w/e 05/07/1965 76053 Transfer in from: 70B Feltham    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 4w/e 05/07/1965 76066 Transfer in from: 70B Feltham    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 w/e 24/07/1965 73033 Transfer out to: 9H Patricroft    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 m/e 08/1965 34050 Condemned      
Steam S15 4-6-0 m/e 09/1965 30824 Condemned      
Steam S15 4-6-0 m/e 09/1965 30842 Condemned      
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 m/e 09/1965 34103 Condemned      
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 m/e 10/1965 34042 Condemned      
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 m/e 10/1965 34084 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 m/e 10/1965 73111 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 m/e 10/1965 76062 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 m/e 10/1965 76065 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 m/e 10/1965 76068 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 17/10/1965 80150 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 17/10/1965 82022 Condemned      
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T w/e 24/10/1965 41313 Condemned      
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 4w/e 25/10/1965 D6501 Transfer in from: 73C Hither Green    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 4w/e 25/10/1965 D6503 Transfer in from: 73C Hither Green    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 4w/e 25/10/1965 D6507 Transfer in from: 73C Hither Green    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 4w/e 25/10/1965 D6509 Transfer in from: 73C Hither Green    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 4w/e 25/10/1965 D6515 Transfer in from: 73C Hither Green    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 4w/e 25/10/1965 D6541 Transfer in from: 73C Hither Green    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 4w/e 25/10/1965 D6550 Transfer in from: 73C Hither Green    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 4w/e 25/10/1965 D6580 Transfer in from: 73C Hither Green    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 25/10/1965 34004 Transfer out to: 70F Bournemouth    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 25/10/1965 34025 Transfer out to: 70F Bournemouth    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 25/10/1965 34064 Transfer out to: 70E Salisbury    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 25/10/1965 34076 Transfer out to: 70E Salisbury    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 4w/e 25/10/1965 73089 Transfer out to: 70C Guildford    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 4w/e 25/10/1965 73110 Transfer out to: 70C Guildford    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 4w/e 25/10/1965 73113 Transfer out to: 70G Weymouth Radipole (GWR)    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 4w/e 25/10/1965 73114 Transfer out to: 70G Weymouth Radipole (GWR)    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 4w/e 25/10/1965 76006 Transfer out to: 70F Bournemouth    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 4w/e 25/10/1965 76009 Transfer out to: 70F Bournemouth    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 4w/e 25/10/1965 76010 Transfer out to: 70F Bournemouth    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 4w/e 25/10/1965 76011 Transfer out to: 70F Bournemouth    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 4w/e 25/10/1965 80011 Transfer out to: 70F Bournemouth    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 4w/e 25/10/1965 80012 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 4w/e 25/10/1965 80015 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam Standard Class 2 Tank 2-6-2T w/e 13/11/1965 84010 Transfer in from: 24F Fleetwood    
Steam Standard Class 2 Tank 2-6-2T w/e 13/11/1965 84013 Transfer in from: 9B Stockport Edgeley    
Steam Standard Class 2 Tank 2-6-2T w/e 13/11/1965 84014 Transfer in from: 9B Stockport Edgeley    
Steam Standard Class 2 Tank 2-6-2T w/e 13/11/1965 84015 Transfer in from: 24G Skipton    
Steam Standard Class 2 Tank 2-6-2T w/e 13/11/1965 84016 Transfer in from: 10C Fleetwood    
Steam Standard Class 2 Tank 2-6-2T w/e 13/11/1965 84017 Transfer in from: 9B Stockport Edgeley    
Steam Standard Class 2 Tank 2-6-2T w/e 13/11/1965 84019 Transfer in from: 26C Bolton    
Steam Standard Class 2 Tank 2-6-2T w/e 13/11/1965 84025 Transfer in from: 26C Bolton    
Steam Standard Class 2 Tank 2-6-2T w/e 13/11/1965 84026 Transfer in from: 9B Stockport Edgeley    
Steam Standard Class 2 Tank 2-6-2T w/e 13/11/1965 84028 Transfer in from: 24G Skipton    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 4w/e 22/11/1965 73084 Transfer in from: 70B Feltham    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 4w/e 22/11/1965 73085 Transfer in from: 70B Feltham    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 m/e 12/1965 34033 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 m/e 12/1965 73084 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 m/e 12/1965 73168 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 m/e 12/1965 76060 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 05/12/1965 80102 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 2 Tank 2-6-2T 2w/e 06/12/1965 84010 Transfer out to: 91M To London Midland Region    
Steam Standard Class 2 Tank 2-6-2T 2w/e 06/12/1965 84013 Transfer out to: 91M To London Midland Region    
Steam Standard Class 2 Tank 2-6-2T 2w/e 06/12/1965 84014 Transfer out to: 91M To London Midland Region    
Steam Standard Class 2 Tank 2-6-2T 2w/e 06/12/1965 84015 Transfer out to: 91M To London Midland Region    
Steam Standard Class 2 Tank 2-6-2T 2w/e 06/12/1965 84016 Transfer out to: 91M To London Midland Region    
Steam Standard Class 2 Tank 2-6-2T 2w/e 06/12/1965 84017 Transfer out to: 91M To London Midland Region    
Steam Standard Class 2 Tank 2-6-2T 2w/e 06/12/1965 84019 Transfer out to: 91M To London Midland Region    
Steam Standard Class 2 Tank 2-6-2T 2w/e 06/12/1965 84025 Transfer out to: 91M To London Midland Region    
Steam Standard Class 2 Tank 2-6-2T 2w/e 06/12/1965 84026 Transfer out to: 91M To London Midland Region    
Steam Standard Class 2 Tank 2-6-2T 2w/e 06/12/1965 84028 Transfer out to: 91M To London Midland Region    
Steam Standard Class 2 Tank 2-6-2T 2w/e 06/12/1965 84010 Transfer in from: 91M To London Midland Region    
Steam Standard Class 2 Tank 2-6-2T 2w/e 06/12/1965 84013 Transfer in from: 91M To London Midland Region    
Steam Standard Class 2 Tank 2-6-2T 2w/e 06/12/1965 84014 Transfer in from: 91M To London Midland Region    
Steam Standard Class 2 Tank 2-6-2T 2w/e 06/12/1965 84015 Transfer in from: 91M To London Midland Region    
Steam Standard Class 2 Tank 2-6-2T 2w/e 06/12/1965 84016 Transfer in from: 91M To London Midland Region    
Steam Standard Class 2 Tank 2-6-2T 2w/e 06/12/1965 84017 Transfer in from: 91M To London Midland Region    
Steam Standard Class 2 Tank 2-6-2T 2w/e 06/12/1965 84019 Transfer in from: 91M To London Midland Region    
Steam Standard Class 2 Tank 2-6-2T 2w/e 06/12/1965 84025 Transfer in from: 91M To London Midland Region    
Steam Standard Class 2 Tank 2-6-2T 2w/e 06/12/1965 84026 Transfer in from: 91M To London Midland Region    
Steam Standard Class 2 Tank 2-6-2T 2w/e 06/12/1965 84028 Transfer in from: 91M To London Midland Region    
Steam Standard Class 2 Tank 2-6-2T 11/12/1965 84010 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 2 Tank 2-6-2T 11/12/1965 84013 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 2 Tank 2-6-2T 11/12/1965 84014 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 2 Tank 2-6-2T 11/12/1965 84015 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 2 Tank 2-6-2T 11/12/1965 84016 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 2 Tank 2-6-2T 11/12/1965 84017 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 2 Tank 2-6-2T 11/12/1965 84019 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 2 Tank 2-6-2T 11/12/1965 84025 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 2 Tank 2-6-2T 11/12/1965 84026 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 2 Tank 2-6-2T 11/12/1965 84028 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 4w/e 20/12/1965 80144 Transfer in from: 70E Salisbury    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 m/e 01/1966 34041 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 09/01/1966 80132 Condemned      
Diesel 08 0-6-0 3w/e 10/01/1966 D3270 Transfer in from: 70B Feltham    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 3w/e 10/01/1966 D6529 Transfer in from: 73C Hither Green    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 3w/e 10/01/1966 D6573 Transfer in from: 73C Hither Green    
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 30/01/1966 82024 Condemned      
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 m/e 02/1966 34079 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 m/e 02/1966 75066 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 m/e 02/1966 76019 Condemned      
Diesel 07 0-6-0 4w/e 07/02/1966 D2986 Transfer in from: 71I Southampton Docks    
Diesel 07 0-6-0 4w/e 07/02/1966 D2987 Transfer in from: 71I Southampton Docks    
Diesel 07 0-6-0 4w/e 07/02/1966 D2988 Transfer in from: 71I Southampton Docks    
Diesel 07 0-6-0 4w/e 07/02/1966 D2989 Transfer in from: 71I Southampton Docks    
Diesel 07 0-6-0 4w/e 07/02/1966 D2990 Transfer in from: 71I Southampton Docks    
Diesel 07 0-6-0 4w/e 07/02/1966 D2991 Transfer in from: 71I Southampton Docks    
Diesel 07 0-6-0 4w/e 07/02/1966 D2992 Transfer in from: 71I Southampton Docks    
Diesel 07 0-6-0 4w/e 07/02/1966 D2993 Transfer in from: 71I Southampton Docks    
Diesel 07 0-6-0 4w/e 07/02/1966 D2994 Transfer in from: 71I Southampton Docks    
Diesel 07 0-6-0 4w/e 07/02/1966 D2995 Transfer in from: 71I Southampton Docks    
Diesel 07 0-6-0 4w/e 07/02/1966 D2996 Transfer in from: 71I Southampton Docks    
Diesel 07 0-6-0 4w/e 07/02/1966 D2997 Transfer in from: 71I Southampton Docks    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 4w/e 07/02/1966 D6500 Transfer in from: 73C Hither Green    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 4w/e 07/02/1966 D6511 Transfer in from: 73C Hither Green    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 4w/e 07/02/1966 80142 Transfer in from: 70E Salisbury    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 4w/e 07/02/1966 80144 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 03/03/1966 80142 Condemned      
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 4w/e 07/03/1966 D6510 Transfer in from: 73C Hither Green    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 4w/e 07/03/1966 D6517 Transfer in from: 34E New England    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 4w/e 07/03/1966 D6522 Transfer in from: 73C Hither Green    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 m/e 04/1966 34082 Condemned      
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 m/e 04/1966 34097 Condemned      
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 4w/e 04/04/1966 D6516 Transfer in from: 73C Hither Green    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 4w/e 02/05/1966 D6514 Transfer in from: 73C Hither Green    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 4w/e 02/05/1966 D6518 Transfer in from: 73C Hither Green    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 4w/e 02/05/1966 D6519 Transfer in from: 73C Hither Green    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 w/e 28/05/1966 D2030 Transfer in from: 32B Ipswich    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 m/e 06/1966 34086 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 m/e 06/1966 73170 Condemned      
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 27/06/1966 34008 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 27/06/1966 34009 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 27/06/1966 34017 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 27/06/1966 34018 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 27/06/1966 34019 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 27/06/1966 34034 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 27/06/1966 34036 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 27/06/1966 34037 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 4w/e 27/06/1966 73085 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 4w/e 27/06/1966 73115 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 4w/e 27/06/1966 73117 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 4w/e 27/06/1966 73118 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 4w/e 27/06/1966 76012 Transfer out to: 70C Guildford    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 4w/e 27/06/1966 76016 Transfer out to: 70C Guildford    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 4w/e 27/06/1966 76018 Transfer out to: 70C Guildford    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 4w/e 27/06/1966 76031 Transfer out to: 70C Guildford    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 4w/e 27/06/1966 76033 Transfer out to: 70C Guildford    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 4w/e 27/06/1966 76053 Transfer out to: 70C Guildford    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 4w/e 27/06/1966 76058 Transfer out to: 70C Guildford    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 4w/e 27/06/1966 76059 Transfer out to: 70C Guildford    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 m/e 07/1966 34101 Condemned      
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T m/e 07/1966 41287 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 m/e 07/1966 75078 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 10/07/1966 82018 Condemned      
Diesel 03 0-6-0 4w/e 25/07/1966 D2030 Transfer in from: 70D Eastleigh    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 07/08/1966 80083 Condemned      
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 4w/e 22/08/1966 D6531 Transfer in from: 73C Hither Green    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 4w/e 22/08/1966 D6538 Transfer in from: 73C Hither Green    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 4w/e 22/08/1966 D6539 Transfer in from: 73C Hither Green    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 4w/e 22/08/1966 D6542 Transfer in from: 73C Hither Green    
Steam USA 0-6-0T 4w/e 22/08/1966 30064 Transfer out to: 91W To Western Region / GWR    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T m/e 09/1966 41294 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 m/e 09/1966 75065 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 m/e 09/1966 75069 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 m/e 09/1966 75070 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 04/09/1966 80065 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 04/09/1966 80082 Condemned      
Diesel Brush Type 4 Co-Co 4w/e 19/09/1966 D1923 Transfer in from: 86A Cardiff Canton    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 4w/e 19/09/1966 D2040 Transfer in from: 75C Norwood Junction    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 4w/e 19/09/1966 D6543 Transfer in from: 73C Hither Green    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T m/e 10/1966 41299 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 m/e 10/1966 73169 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 m/e 10/1966 73171 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 02/10/1966 82023 Condemned      
Diesel Brush Type 4 Co-Co 4w/e 17/10/1966 D1921 Transfer in from: 86A Cardiff Canton    
Diesel Brush Type 4 Co-Co 4w/e 17/10/1966 D1922 Transfer in from: 86A Cardiff Canton    
Steam USA 0-6-0T 4w/e 17/10/1966 30064 Transfer in from: 91W To Western Region / GWR    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 4w/e 17/10/1966 D6552 Transfer in from: 73C Hither Green    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 4w/e 17/10/1966 D6565 Transfer in from: 73C Hither Green    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 4w/e 17/10/1966 D6577 Transfer in from: 73C Hither Green    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 4w/e 17/10/1966 80151 Transfer in from: 70E Salisbury    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 4w/e 17/10/1966 80152 Transfer in from: 70E Salisbury    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 4w/e 17/10/1966 76069 Transfer out to: 70C Guildford    
Diesel 04 0-6-0 4w/e 14/11/1966 D2288 Transfer in from: 71B Bournemouth    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 20/11/1966 75079 Condemned      
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 4w/e 12/12/1966 D6551 Transfer in from: 73C Hither Green    
Steam USA 0-6-0T w/e 08/01/1967 30073 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 w/e 08/01/1967 76061 Condemned      
Diesel Brush Type 4 Co-Co 4w/e 09/01/1967 D1924 Transfer in from: 86A Cardiff Canton    
Diesel Brush Type 4 Co-Co 4w/e 09/01/1967 D1925 Transfer in from: 82A Bristol Bath Road    
Diesel Brush Type 4 Co-Co 4w/e 09/01/1967 D1926 Transfer in from: 82A Bristol Bath Road    
Diesel 04 0-6-0 w/e 18/01/1967 D2231 Transfer in from: 50A York (North)    
Diesel 04 0-6-0 w/e 18/01/1967 D2255 Transfer in from: 73C Hither Green    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo w/e 18/01/1967 D6553 Transfer in from: 73C Hither Green    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo w/e 18/01/1967 D6554 Transfer in from: 73C Hither Green    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 w/e 19/03/1967 34088 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 w/e 19/03/1967 73119 Condemned      
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 w/e 26/03/1967 34077 Condemned      
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 w/e 02/04/1967 34071 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 w/e 09/04/1967 76063 Condemned      
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 5w/e 17/04/1967 D6529 Transfer in from: 73C Hither Green    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 5w/e 17/04/1967 41319 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 5w/e 17/04/1967 73155 Transfer out to: 70C Guildford    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T w/e 07/05/1967 80151 Condemned      
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 15/05/1967 34037 Transfer in from: 70A Nine Elms    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 4w/e 15/05/1967 D6513 Transfer in from: 73C Hither Green    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 15/05/1967 34023 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 w/e 25/06/1967 34098 Condemned      
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 w/e 25/06/1967 34104 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 02/07/1967 75068 Condemned      
Diesel 03 0-6-0 4w/e 09/07/1967 D2041 Transfer in from: 70C Guildford    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 4w/e 09/07/1967 D2043 Transfer in from: 70G Weymouth Radipole (GWR)    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 4w/e 09/07/1967 D2082 Transfer in from: 71G Weymouth Radipole (GWR)    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 09/07/1967 D3472 Transfer in from: 73C Hither Green    
Steam USA 0-6-0T w/e 09/07/1967 30064 Condemned      
Steam USA 0-6-0T w/e 09/07/1967 30067 Condemned      
Steam USA 0-6-0T w/e 09/07/1967 30069 Condemned      
Steam USA 0-6-0T w/e 09/07/1967 30071 Condemned      
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 w/e 09/07/1967 34037 Condemned      
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 w/e 09/07/1967 34060 Condemned      
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 w/e 09/07/1967 34087 Condemned      
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 w/e 09/07/1967 34090 Condemned      
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 w/e 09/07/1967 34093 Condemned      
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 w/e 09/07/1967 34095 Condemned      
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 w/e 09/07/1967 34102 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 09/07/1967 75074 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 09/07/1967 75075 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 09/07/1967 75076 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 09/07/1967 75077 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 w/e 09/07/1967 76064 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 w/e 09/07/1967 76066 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T w/e 09/07/1967 80016 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T w/e 09/07/1967 80139 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T w/e 09/07/1967 80152 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T w/e 09/07/1967 82019 Condemned      
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo w/e 10/10/1967 D6539 Transfer in from: 73C Hither Green    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo w/e 10/10/1967 D6580 Transfer in from: 73C Hither Green    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 w/e 24/10/1967 D2083 Transfer in from: 73C Hither Green    
Diesel 04 0-6-0 4w/e 01/01/1968 D2289 Transfer in from: 75C Selhurst    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 01/01/1968 D3094 Transfer in from: 70B Feltham    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 01/01/1968 D3095 Transfer in from: 75C Norwood Junction    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 4w/e 29/01/1968 D2197 Transfer in from: 98S      
Diesel 12 0-6-0 w/e 05/02/1968 15221 Transfer in from: 73F Ashford    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 2w/e 18/03/1968 D6579 Transfer in from: 73C Hither Green    
Diesel 04 0-6-0 3w/e 08/04/1968 D2239 Transfer in from: 70F Bournemouth    
Electric ED's Bo-Bo 4w/e 14/06/1968 E6007 Transfer out to: 75D Stewarts Lane    
Electric ED's Bo-Bo 4w/e 14/06/1968 E6008 Transfer out to: 75D Stewarts Lane    
Electric ED's Bo-Bo 4w/e 14/06/1968 E6009 Transfer out to: 75D Stewarts Lane    
Electric ED's Bo-Bo 4w/e 14/06/1968 E6010 Transfer out to: 75D Stewarts Lane    
Electric ED's Bo-Bo 4w/e 14/06/1968 E6011 Transfer out to: 75D Stewarts Lane    
Electric ED's Bo-Bo 4w/e 14/06/1968 E6012 Transfer out to: 75D Stewarts Lane    
Electric ED's Bo-Bo 4w/e 14/06/1968 E6013 Transfer out to: 75D Stewarts Lane    
Electric ED's Bo-Bo 4w/e 14/06/1968 E6014 Transfer out to: 75D Stewarts Lane    
Electric ED's Bo-Bo 4w/e 14/06/1968 E6015 Transfer out to: 75D Stewarts Lane    
Electric ED's Bo-Bo 4w/e 14/06/1968 E6016 Transfer out to: 75D Stewarts Lane    
Electric ED's Bo-Bo 4w/e 14/06/1968 E6017 Transfer out to: 75D Stewarts Lane    
Electric ED's Bo-Bo 4w/e 14/06/1968 E6018 Transfer out to: 75D Stewarts Lane    
Electric ED's Bo-Bo 4w/e 14/06/1968 E6019 Transfer out to: 75D Stewarts Lane    
Electric ED's Bo-Bo 4w/e 14/06/1968 E6020 Transfer out to: 75D Stewarts Lane    
Electric ED's Bo-Bo 4w/e 14/06/1968 E6021 Transfer out to: 75D Stewarts Lane    
Electric ED's Bo-Bo 4w/e 14/06/1968 E6022 Transfer out to: 75D Stewarts Lane    
Electric ED's Bo-Bo 4w/e 14/06/1968 E6023 Transfer out to: 75D Stewarts Lane    
Electric ED's Bo-Bo 4w/e 14/06/1968 E6024 Transfer out to: 75D Stewarts Lane    
Electric ED's Bo-Bo 4w/e 14/06/1968 E6025 Transfer out to: 75D Stewarts Lane    
Electric ED's Bo-Bo 4w/e 14/06/1968 E6026 Transfer out to: 75D Stewarts Lane    
Electric ED's Bo-Bo 4w/e 14/06/1968 E6027 Transfer out to: 75D Stewarts Lane    
Electric ED's Bo-Bo 4w/e 14/06/1968 E6028 Transfer out to: 75D Stewarts Lane    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 2w/e 23/09/1968 D6522 Transfer in from: 73C Hither Green    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 2w/e 23/09/1968 D6547 Transfer in from: 73C Hither Green    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 30/09/1968 D3045 Transfer in from: 70B Feltham    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 30/09/1968 D3094 Transfer in from: 70B Feltham    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 30/09/1968 D3096 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 30/09/1968 D3100 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 30/09/1968 D3217 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 2w/e 11/10/1968 D2197 Transfer in from: 91S To Southern Region    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 01/01/1969 D3047 Transfer in from: 70B Feltham    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 01/01/1969 D3094 Transfer in from: 70B Feltham    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 4w/e 01/01/1969 D6552 Transfer in from: 73C Hither Green    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 4w/e 01/01/1969 D6555 Transfer in from: 73C Hither Green    
Diesel 09 0-6-0 4w/e 10/02/1969 D4108 Transfer in from: 91S To Southern Region    
Diesel 04 0-6-0 3w/e 05/03/1969 D2295 Transfer in from: 70F Bournemouth    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 3w/e 25/03/1969 D2028 Transfer in from: 70F Bournemouth    
Diesel 09 0-6-0 5w/e 28/04/1969 D4111 Transfer in from: 70B Feltham    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 03/06/1969 D3048 Transfer in from: 70B Feltham    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 03/06/1969 D3271 Transfer in from: 70B Feltham    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 03/06/1969 D3272 Transfer in from: 70B Feltham    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 03/06/1969 D3273 Transfer in from: 70B Feltham    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 03/06/1969 D3274 Transfer in from: 70B Feltham    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 30/04/1970 D3219 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 01/01/1971 D3820 Transfer in from: 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport)    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 01/01/1971 D3924 Transfer in from: 67C Ayr    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 01/01/1971 D3928 Transfer in from: 67C Ayr    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 01/01/1971 D3809 Transfer in from: 81D Reading (W.R.)    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 01/01/1971 D3815 Transfer in from: 82A Bristol Bath Road    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 01/01/1971 D3822 Transfer in from: 81D Reading (W.R.)    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 5w/e 30/09/1971 D6549 Transfer in from: 73C Hither Green    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 5w/e 30/09/1971 D6550 Transfer in from: 73C Hither Green    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 5w/e 30/09/1971 D6551 Transfer in from: 73C Hither Green    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 5w/e 30/09/1971 D6552 Transfer in from: 73C Hither Green    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 5w/e 30/09/1971 D6553 Transfer in from: 73C Hither Green    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 29/10/1971 D3472 Transfer in from: 73C Hither Green    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 9w/e 29/12/1971 D6554 Transfer in from: 73C Hither Green    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 9w/e 04/10/1972 D3042 Transfer in from: 73C Hither Green    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 9w/e 04/10/1972 D3043 Transfer in from: 73C Hither Green    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 6w/e 16/11/1972 D3048 Transfer in from: 73F Ashford    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 03/02/1973 D4013 Transfer in from: 86B Ebbw Junction (Newport)    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 9w/e 19/07/1973 D3041 Transfer in from: 75C Selhurst    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 9w/e 19/07/1973 D4159 Transfer in from: BR Bristol Bath Road    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 08/12/1973 D4163 Transfer in from: 82C Swindon    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 5w/e 07/03/1974 08850 Transfer in from: EJ Ebbw Junction (Newport)    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 5w/e 07/03/1974 08854 Transfer in from: 83A Newton Abbot    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 23/03/1974 08831 Transfer in from: 81A Old Oak Common    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 3w/e 26/03/1974 08831 Transfer in from: EH Eastleigh    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 6w/e 30/06/1974 33031 Transfer in from: NG      
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 3w/e 18/04/1975 33032 Transfer in from: NG      
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 3w/e 18/04/1975 33033 Transfer in from: HG Hither Green    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 m/e 31/07/1975 08028 Transfer in from: 91S To Southern Region    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 m/e 31/07/1975 08031 Transfer in from: 91S To Southern Region    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 m/e 31/07/1975 08323 Transfer in from: 91S To Southern Region    
Diesel 09 0-6-0 m/e 31/01/1976 09024 Transfer in from: BR Bristol Bath Road    
Diesel 09 0-6-0 m/e 31/01/1976 09025 Transfer in from: BR Bristol Bath Road    
Electric Class 71 Bo-Bo 06/1976 74006 Condemned      
Diesel 07 0-6-0 m/e 31/10/1976 07012 Transfer in from: BM Bournemouth    
Diesel 07 0-6-0 m/e 31/10/1976 07013 Transfer in from: BM Bournemouth    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 m/e 31/10/1976 08150 Transfer in from: 75C Selhurst    
Electric Class 74 Bo-Bo 04/06/1977 74002 Condemned      
Electric Class 74 Bo-Bo 12/1977 74001 Condemned      
Electric Class 74 Bo-Bo 12/1977 74003 Condemned      
Electric Class 74 Bo-Bo 12/1977 74004 Condemned      
Electric Class 74 Bo-Bo 12/1977 74005 Condemned      
Electric Class 71 Bo-Bo 12/1977 74007 Condemned      
Electric Class 74 Bo-Bo 12/1977 74008 Condemned