Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 749 Today
» 1201 Yesterday
» 4265 Week
» 32223 Month
» 66865 Year
» 1288430 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Exmouth Junction


Type Class Wheels Period Date Number Event Code Depot Length of Stay Notes
Steam 135 4-4-0 y/e 1887 141 Transfer in from: - Exeter Queen Street    
Steam 135 4-4-0 y/e 1887 142 Transfer in from: - Exeter Queen Street    
Steam 135 4-4-0 y/e 1887 143 Transfer in from: - Exeter Queen Street    
Steam T3 4-4-0 m/e 06/1893 569 1st Allocation        
Steam T3 4-4-0 m/e 06/1893 570 1st Allocation        
Steam T3 4-4-0 m/e 11/1893 576 1st Allocation        
Steam X6 4-4-0 m/e 04/1896 663 1st Allocation        
Steam X6 4-4-0 m/e 06/1896 665 1st Allocation        
Steam X6 4-4-0 m/e 06/1896 666 1st Allocation        
Steam T1 0-4-4T m/e 07/1896 364 1st Allocation        
Steam T1 0-4-4T m/e 07/1896 365 1st Allocation        
Steam T1 0-4-4T m/e 07/1896 366 1st Allocation        
Steam T1 0-4-4T m/e 07/1896 367 1st Allocation        
Steam 135 4-4-0 m/e 12/1913 0141 Condemned      
Steam 135 4-4-0 m/e 12/1913 0142 Condemned      
Steam 135 4-4-0 m/e 06/1923 0312 Condemned      
Steam Lord Nelson 4-6-0 m/e 03/1930 850 Transfer in from:        
Steam Lord Nelson 4-6-0 m/e 04/1930 850 Transfer out to: BAT Stewarts Lane    
Steam T3 4-4-0 m/e 07/1931 570 Condemned      
Steam T3 4-4-0 m/e 01/1932 569 Condemned      
Steam X6 4-4-0 m/e 06/1933 665 Condemned      
Steam T3 4-4-0 m/e 08/1933 576 Condemned      
Steam X6 4-4-0 m/e 10/1936 663 Condemned      
Steam T1 0-4-4T m/e 03/1938 365 Condemned      
Steam X6 4-4-0 m/e 04/1943 666 Condemned      
Steam T1 0-4-4T m/e 10/1944 364 Condemned      
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 21/06/1945 21C101 1st Allocation        
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 01/12/1947 21C127 Transfer in from:        
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 01/12/1947 21C128 Transfer in from:        
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 01/12/1947 21C129 Transfer in from:        
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 01/01/1948 105 Snapshot        
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 01/01/1948 124 Snapshot        
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 01/01/1948 133 Snapshot        
Steam Small Hoppers 4-4-0 01/01/1948 135 Snapshot        
Steam Small Hoppers 4-4-0 01/01/1948 137 Snapshot        
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 01/01/1948 1407 Snapshot        
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 01/01/1948 1408 Snapshot        
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 01/01/1948 1409 Snapshot        
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 01/01/1948 1625 Snapshot FRA Fratton    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 01/01/1948 1635 Snapshot        
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 01/01/1948 1638 Snapshot        
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 01/01/1948 1828 Snapshot        
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 01/01/1948 1832 Snapshot        
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 01/01/1948 1833 Snapshot        
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 01/01/1948 1834 Snapshot        
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 01/01/1948 1835 Snapshot        
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 01/01/1948 1836 Snapshot        
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 01/01/1948 1837 Snapshot        
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 01/01/1948 1838 Snapshot        
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 01/01/1948 1839 Snapshot        
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 01/01/1948 1840 Snapshot        
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 01/01/1948 1841 Snapshot        
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 01/01/1948 1842 Snapshot        
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 01/01/1948 1845 Snapshot        
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 01/01/1948 1847 Snapshot        
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 01/01/1948 1853 Snapshot        
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 01/01/1948 1855 Snapshot        
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 01/01/1948 1856 Snapshot        
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 01/01/1948 1869 Snapshot        
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 01/01/1948 1871 Snapshot        
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 01/01/1948 1874 Snapshot        
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 01/01/1948 1875 Snapshot        
Steam O2 0-4-4T 01/01/1948 192 Snapshot        
Steam O2 0-4-4T 01/01/1948 193 Snapshot        
Steam O2 0-4-4T 01/01/1948 199 Snapshot        
Steam O2 0-4-4T 01/01/1948 207 Snapshot        
Steam El Radials 0-6-2T 01/01/1948 2124 Snapshot        
Steam El Radials 0-6-2T 01/01/1948 2135 Snapshot        
Steam Merchant Navy 4-6-2 01/01/1948 21C1 Snapshot        
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 01/01/1948 21C112 Snapshot        
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 01/01/1948 21C113 Snapshot        
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 01/01/1948 21C114 Snapshot        
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 01/01/1948 21C116 Snapshot        
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 01/01/1948 21C118 Snapshot        
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 01/01/1948 21C121 Snapshot        
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 01/01/1948 21C124 Snapshot        
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 01/01/1948 21C127 Snapshot EXJ Exmouth Junction    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 01/01/1948 21C127 Snapshot EXJ Exmouth Junction    
Steam Merchant Navy 4-6-2 01/01/1948 21C2 Snapshot        
Steam Merchant Navy 4-6-2 01/01/1948 21C3 Snapshot        
Steam Merchant Navy 4-6-2 01/01/1948 21C4 Snapshot        
Steam Merchant Navy 4-6-2 01/01/1948 21C5 Snapshot        
Steam O2 0-4-4T 01/01/1948 224 Snapshot        
Steam O2 0-4-4T 01/01/1948 230 Snapshot        
Steam O2 0-4-4T 01/01/1948 232 Snapshot        
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 01/01/1948 24 Snapshot        
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 01/01/1948 245 Snapshot        
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 01/01/1948 252 Snapshot        
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 01/01/1948 253 Snapshot        
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 01/01/1948 255 Snapshot        
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 01/01/1948 256 Snapshot        
Steam El Radials 0-6-2T 01/01/1948 2695 Snapshot        
Steam El Radials 0-6-2T 01/01/1948 2697 Snapshot        
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 01/01/1948 282 Snapshot        
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 01/01/1948 283 Snapshot        
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 01/01/1948 30 Snapshot        
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 01/01/1948 301 Snapshot        
Steam Jumbos 0-6-0 01/01/1948 3029 Snapshot        
Steam Radial Tanks 4-4-2T 01/01/1948 3125 Snapshot        
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 01/01/1948 32 Snapshot        
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 01/01/1948 320 Snapshot        
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 01/01/1948 323 Snapshot        
Steam Small Hoppers 4-4-0 01/01/1948 329 Snapshot        
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 01/01/1948 34 Snapshot        
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 01/01/1948 34002 Snapshot        
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 01/01/1948 34003 Snapshot        
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 01/01/1948 34004 Snapshot        
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 01/01/1948 34005 Snapshot        
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 01/01/1948 34006 Snapshot        
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 01/01/1948 34007 Snapshot        
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 01/01/1948 34008 Snapshot        
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 01/01/1948 34009 Snapshot        
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 01/01/1948 34010 Snapshot        
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 01/01/1948 34011 Snapshot        
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 01/01/1948 34015 Snapshot        
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 01/01/1948 34017 Snapshot        
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 01/01/1948 34019 Snapshot        
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 01/01/1948 34020 Snapshot        
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 01/01/1948 34025 Snapshot        
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 01/01/1948 34026 Snapshot        
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 01/01/1948 34028 Snapshot EXJ Exmouth Junction    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 01/01/1948 34028 Snapshot EXJ Exmouth Junction    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 01/01/1948 34029 Snapshot EXJ Exmouth Junction    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 01/01/1948 34029 Snapshot EXJ Exmouth Junction    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 01/01/1948 34041 Snapshot        
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 01/01/1948 34042 Snapshot        
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 01/01/1948 34043 Snapshot        
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 01/01/1948 34044 Snapshot        
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 01/01/1948 34045 Snapshot        
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 01/01/1948 34046 Snapshot        
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 01/01/1948 34047 Snapshot        
Steam Radial Tanks 4-4-2T 01/01/1948 3488 Snapshot        
Steam Radial Tanks 4-4-2T 01/01/1948 3520 Snapshot        
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 01/01/1948 356 Snapshot        
Steam T1 0-4-4T 01/01/1948 366 Snapshot ELH Eastleigh    
Steam T1 0-4-4T 01/01/1948 367 Snapshot ELH Eastleigh    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 01/01/1948 37 Snapshot        
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 01/01/1948 374 Snapshot        
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 01/01/1948 375 Snapshot        
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 01/01/1948 376 Snapshot        
Steam Small Hoppers 4-4-0 01/01/1948 382 Snapshot        
Steam Small Hoppers 4-4-0 01/01/1948 383 Snapshot        
Steam Small Hoppers 4-4-0 01/01/1948 389 Snapshot        
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 01/01/1948 39 Snapshot        
Steam Large Hoppers 4-4-0 01/01/1948 436 Snapshot        
Steam Large Hoppers 4-4-0 01/01/1948 439 Snapshot        
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 01/01/1948 46 Snapshot        
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 01/01/1948 49 Snapshot        
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 01/01/1948 55 Snapshot        
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 01/01/1948 668 Snapshot        
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 01/01/1948 669 Snapshot        
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 01/01/1948 671 Snapshot        
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 01/01/1948 723 Snapshot        
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 01/01/1948 724 Snapshot        
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 01/01/1948 725 Snapshot        
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 01/01/1948 730 Snapshot        
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 01/01/1948 747 Snapshot        
Steam S15 4-6-0 01/01/1948 823 Snapshot        
Steam S15 4-6-0 01/01/1948 824 Snapshot        
Steam S15 4-6-0 01/01/1948 825 Snapshot        
Steam S15 4-6-0 01/01/1948 826 Snapshot        
Steam S15 4-6-0 01/01/1948 827 Snapshot        
Steam S15 4-6-0 01/01/1948 843 Snapshot        
Steam S15 4-6-0 01/01/1948 844 Snapshot        
Steam S15 4-6-0 01/01/1948 845 Snapshot        
Steam S15 4-6-0 01/01/1948 846 Snapshot        
Steam S15 4-6-0 01/01/1948 847 Snapshot        
Steam Z 0-8-0T 01/01/1948 954 Snapshot        
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 4w/e 02/01/1948 1625 Transfer in from: EXJ Exmouth Junction    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 4w/e 02/01/1948 1874 Transfer in from: EXJ Exmouth Junction    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 4w/e 02/01/1948 25 Transfer in from:        
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 4w/e 02/01/1948 32 Transfer in from: EXJ Exmouth Junction    
Steam S15 4-6-0 4w/e 02/01/1948 843 Transfer in from: EXJ Exmouth Junction    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 4w/e 02/01/1948 1625 Transfer out to: EXJ Exmouth Junction    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 4w/e 02/01/1948 1874 Transfer out to: EXJ Exmouth Junction    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 4w/e 02/01/1948 32 Transfer out to: EXJ Exmouth Junction    
Steam S15 4-6-0 4w/e 02/01/1948 843 Transfer out to: EXJ Exmouth Junction    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 8w/e 01/03/1948 744 Transfer in from: SAL Salisbury    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 8w/e 01/03/1948 746 Transfer in from: SAL Salisbury    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 8w/e 01/03/1948 21C113 Transfer out to: PLY Plymouth Friary    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 8w/e 01/03/1948 21C121 Transfer out to: PLY Plymouth Friary    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 8w/e 01/03/1948 34003 Transfer out to: PLY Plymouth Friary    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 8w/e 01/03/1948 34011 Transfer out to: PLY Plymouth Friary    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 8w/e 01/03/1948 34047 Transfer out to: SAL Salisbury    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 01/04/1948 34047 Transfer in from: SAL Salisbury    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 01/04/1948 34019 Transfer out to: ELH Eastleigh    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 01/04/1948 34042 Transfer out to: SAL Salisbury    
Steam Small Hoppers 4-4-0 4w/e 01/04/1948 382 Transfer out to: GFD Guildford    
Steam Small Hoppers 4-4-0 7w/e 01/06/1948 137 To Store      
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 7w/e 01/06/1948 282 To Store      
Steam Small Hoppers 4-4-0 7w/e 01/06/1948 329 To Store      
Steam Small Hoppers 4-4-0 7w/e 01/06/1948 389 To Store      
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 7w/e 01/06/1948 723 To Store      
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 7w/e 01/06/1948 1807 Transfer in from: GFD Guildford    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 7w/e 01/06/1948 1809 Transfer in from: GFD Guildford    
Steam S15 4-6-0 7w/e 01/06/1948 841 Transfer in from: FEL Feltham    
Steam S15 4-6-0 7w/e 01/06/1948 842 Transfer in from: FEL Feltham    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 7w/e 01/06/1948 1625 Transfer out to: FRA Fratton    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 7w/e 01/06/1948 1871 Transfer out to: PLY Plymouth Friary    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 7w/e 01/06/1948 1874 Transfer out to: PLY Plymouth Friary    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 7w/e 01/06/1948 1875 Transfer out to: PLY Plymouth Friary    
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 7w/e 01/06/1948 301 Transfer out to: BAT Stewarts Lane    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 7w/e 01/06/1948 356 Transfer out to: PLY Plymouth Friary    
Steam O2 0-4-4T 8w/e 01/08/1948 207 Transfer out to: PLY Plymouth Friary    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 8w/e 01/08/1948 37 Transfer out to: PLY Plymouth Friary    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 8w/e 01/08/1948 375 Transfer out to: PLY Plymouth Friary    
Steam Small Hoppers 4-4-0 m/e 03/1949 30135 Condemned      
Steam Small Hoppers 4-4-0 m/e 05/1949 30383 Condemned      
Steam Large Hoppers 4-4-0 m/e 05/1949 30439 Condemned      
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 4w/e 30/06/1949 30707 Transfer in from:        
Steam O2 0-4-4T 5w/e 29/10/1949 30233 Transfer in from: DOR Dorchester    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 5w/e 29/10/1949 31638 Transfer out to: FAV Faversham    
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 6w/e 12/12/1949 30716 Transfer in from: YEO Yeovil Town    
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 6w/e 12/12/1949 30717 Transfer in from: WAD Wadebridge    
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 4w/e 17/06/1950 30706 Reinstated YEO Yeovil Town    
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 4w/e 17/06/1950 30715 Reinstated SAL Salisbury    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 4w/e 17/06/1950 30039 To Store      
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 4w/e 09/09/1950 30039 Transfer in from:        
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 4w/e 09/09/1950 31829 Transfer in from: ELH Eastleigh    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 4w/e 09/09/1950 31830 Transfer in from: AFD Ashford    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 4w/e 09/09/1950 31831 Transfer in from: FRA Fratton    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 09/09/1950 34003 Transfer in from: 72D Plymouth Friary    
Steam S15 4-6-0 4w/e 09/09/1950 30826 Transfer out to: 72B Salisbury    
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 4w/e 07/10/1950 30714 Transfer in from: YEO Yeovil Town    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 07/10/1950 34034 Transfer in from: 73A Stewarts Lane    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 4w/e 13/11/1950 31828 Transfer in from: EXJ Exmouth Junction    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 4w/e 13/11/1950 31836 Transfer in from: EXJ Exmouth Junction    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 4w/e 13/11/1950 31846 Transfer in from: SAL Salisbury    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 4w/e 13/11/1950 31866 Transfer in from: ELH Eastleigh    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 4w/e 13/11/1950 31867 Transfer in from: ELH Eastleigh    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 4w/e 13/11/1950 31828 Transfer out to: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 4w/e 13/11/1950 31836 Transfer out to: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 08/12/1950 34012 Transfer in from: EXJ Exmouth Junction    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 08/12/1950 34021 Transfer in from: PLY Plymouth Friary    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 4w/e 08/12/1950 30744 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 4w/e 08/12/1950 30746 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 4w/e 08/12/1950 30747 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 08/12/1950 34012 Transfer out to: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 08/12/1950 34034 Transfer out to: 72D Plymouth Friary    
Steam Jumbos 0-6-0 4w/e 05/02/1951 30580 Transfer in from: GFD Guildford    
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 4w/e 05/02/1951 30704 Transfer in from: BAT Stewarts Lane    
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 4w/e 05/02/1951 30705 Transfer in from: 71B Bournemouth    
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 4w/e 05/02/1951 30708 Transfer in from: 71B Bournemouth    
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 4w/e 05/02/1951 30711 Transfer in from: 71D Fratton    
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 4w/e 05/02/1951 30712 Transfer in from: YEO Yeovil Town    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 4w/e 05/02/1951 31634 Transfer in from: BAS Basingstoke    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 4w/e 05/02/1951 31635 Transfer in from: EXJ Exmouth Junction    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 4w/e 05/02/1951 31636 Transfer in from: SAL Salisbury    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 4w/e 05/02/1951 31843 Transfer in from: RED Redhill    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 4w/e 05/02/1951 31844 Transfer in from: RED Redhill    
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 4w/e 05/02/1951 30283 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 4w/e 05/02/1951 30374 Transfer out to: 72D Plymouth Friary    
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 4w/e 05/02/1951 30730 Transfer out to: 71B Bournemouth    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 4w/e 05/02/1951 31407 Transfer out to: 74A Ashford    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 4w/e 05/02/1951 31408 Transfer out to: 74A Ashford    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 4w/e 05/02/1951 31635 Transfer out to: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 4w/e 05/02/1951 31807 Transfer out to: 71D Fratton    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 05/02/1951 34012 Transfer out to: 72B Salisbury    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 05/02/1951 34015 Transfer out to: 72B Salisbury    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 05/02/1951 34028 Transfer out to: 72B Salisbury    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 6w/e 20/03/1951 30021 Transfer in from: 70C Guildford    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 6w/e 20/03/1951 30023 Transfer in from: BPL Barnstaple Junction    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 6w/e 20/03/1951 30321 Transfer in from: BPL Barnstaple Junction    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 6w/e 20/03/1951 30374 Transfer in from: 72D Plymouth Friary    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 6w/e 20/03/1951 30375 Transfer in from: PLY Plymouth Friary    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 6w/e 20/03/1951 30455 Transfer in from: 72B Salisbury    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 6w/e 20/03/1951 30457 Transfer in from: 72B Salisbury    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 6w/e 20/03/1951 30670 Transfer in from: BPL Barnstaple Junction    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 6w/e 20/03/1951 34012 Transfer in from: 72B Salisbury    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 6w/e 20/03/1951 34015 Transfer in from: 72B Salisbury    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 6w/e 20/03/1951 34028 Transfer in from: 72B Salisbury    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 6w/e 20/03/1951 356 Transfer in from: PLY Plymouth Friary    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 6w/e 20/03/1951 30039 Transfer out to: 72D Plymouth Friary    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 6w/e 20/03/1951 30252 Transfer out to: 72E Barnstaple Junction    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 6w/e 20/03/1951 30253 Transfer out to: 72E Barnstaple Junction    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 6w/e 20/03/1951 34 Transfer out to: 72D Plymouth Friary    
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 m/e 04/1951 30714 Condemned      
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 4w/e 11/04/1951 30041 Transfer in from: SAL Salisbury    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 4w/e 11/04/1951 31848 Transfer in from: SAL Salisbury    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 4w/e 11/04/1951 31849 Transfer in from: RED Redhill    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 4w/e 11/04/1951 31851 Transfer in from: RED Redhill    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 4w/e 11/04/1951 31852 Transfer in from: RED Redhill    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 11/04/1951 34049 Transfer in from: SAL Salisbury    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 11/04/1951 34050 Transfer in from: SAL Salisbury    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 11/04/1951 34051 Transfer in from: SAL Salisbury    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 11/04/1951 34052 Transfer in from: SAL Salisbury    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 11/04/1951 34053 Transfer in from: BAT Stewarts Lane    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 11/04/1951 34054 Transfer in from: BAT Stewarts Lane    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 11/04/1951 34055 Transfer in from: BAT Stewarts Lane    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 11/04/1951 34056 Transfer in from: BAT Stewarts Lane    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 11/04/1951 34057 Transfer in from: 9E Nine Elms    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 11/04/1951 34058 Transfer in from: 9E Nine Elms    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 11/04/1951 34059 Transfer in from: 9E Nine Elms    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 4w/e 11/04/1951 30049 Transfer out to: 75D Horsham    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 4w/e 11/04/1951 30455 Transfer out to: 70B Feltham    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 4w/e 11/04/1951 30457 Transfer out to: 70B Feltham    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 4w/e 11/04/1951 31866 Transfer out to: 75B Redhill    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 4w/e 11/04/1951 31867 Transfer out to: 75B Redhill    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 4w/e 11/04/1951 31869 Transfer out to: 75B Redhill    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 11/04/1951 34005 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 11/04/1951 34006 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 11/04/1951 34007 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 11/04/1951 34008 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 11/04/1951 34009 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 11/04/1951 34010 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 11/04/1951 34012 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 11/04/1951 34018 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 11/04/1951 34020 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 4w/e 12/05/1951 30021 Transfer in from: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 4w/e 12/05/1951 30023 Transfer in from: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 4w/e 12/05/1951 30044 Transfer in from: BPL Barnstaple Junction    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 4w/e 12/05/1951 30321 Transfer in from: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 4w/e 12/05/1951 30356 Transfer in from: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 4w/e 12/05/1951 30374 Transfer in from: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 4w/e 12/05/1951 30375 Transfer in from: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 4w/e 12/05/1951 31842 Transfer in from: EXJ Exmouth Junction    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 12/05/1951 34013 Transfer in from: PLY Plymouth Friary    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 12/05/1951 34015 Transfer in from: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 12/05/1951 34022 Transfer in from: 9E Nine Elms    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 12/05/1951 34023 Transfer in from: 9E Nine Elms    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 12/05/1951 34028 Transfer in from: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 12/05/1951 34031 Transfer in from: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 12/05/1951 34032 Transfer in from: 72D Plymouth Friary    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 12/05/1951 34033 Transfer in from: 73A Stewarts Lane    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 12/05/1951 34060 Transfer in from: 9E Nine Elms    
Steam Merchant Navy 4-6-2 4w/e 12/05/1951 35005 Transfer in from: EXJ Exmouth Junction    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 4w/e 12/05/1951 42 Transfer in from: BPL Barnstaple Junction    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 4w/e 12/05/1951 255 Transfer out to: 72E Barnstaple Junction    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 4w/e 12/05/1951 30021 Transfer out to: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 4w/e 12/05/1951 30023 Transfer out to: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 4w/e 12/05/1951 30256 Transfer out to: 72E Barnstaple Junction    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 4w/e 12/05/1951 30321 Transfer out to: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 4w/e 12/05/1951 30356 Transfer out to: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 4w/e 12/05/1951 30374 Transfer out to: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 4w/e 12/05/1951 30375 Transfer out to: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 4w/e 12/05/1951 30670 Transfer out to: 72B Salisbury    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 4w/e 12/05/1951 31842 Transfer out to: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 12/05/1951 34015 Transfer out to: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 12/05/1951 34028 Transfer out to: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 12/05/1951 34041 Transfer out to: 71G Bath Green Park (S&D)    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 12/05/1951 34043 Transfer out to: 71G Bath Green Park (S&D)    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 12/05/1951 34044 Transfer out to: 71G Bath Green Park (S&D)    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 12/05/1951 34045 Transfer out to: 72B Salisbury    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 12/05/1951 34046 Transfer out to: 72B Salisbury    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 12/05/1951 34047 Transfer out to: 72B Salisbury    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 12/05/1951 34049 Transfer out to: 72B Salisbury    
Steam Merchant Navy 4-6-2 4w/e 12/05/1951 35005 Transfer out to: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 19/05/1951 34057 Transfer out to: 30A Stratford    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 7w/e 27/06/1951 30040 Transfer in from: BM Bournemouth    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 7w/e 27/06/1951 30357 Transfer in from: ELH Eastleigh    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 7w/e 27/06/1951 34061 Transfer in from: 9E Nine Elms    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 7w/e 27/06/1951 34062 Transfer in from: BAT Stewarts Lane    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 7w/e 27/06/1951 30055 Transfer out to: 71B Bournemouth    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 7w/e 27/06/1951 30105 Transfer out to: 71B Bournemouth    
Steam S15 4-6-0 7w/e 27/06/1951 30823 Transfer out to: 72B Salisbury    
Steam S15 4-6-0 7w/e 27/06/1951 30824 Transfer out to: 72B Salisbury    
Steam S15 4-6-0 7w/e 27/06/1951 30825 Transfer out to: 72B Salisbury    
Steam S15 4-6-0 7w/e 27/06/1951 30846 Transfer out to: 72B Salisbury    
Steam S15 4-6-0 7w/e 27/06/1951 30847 Transfer out to: 72B Salisbury    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 7w/e 27/06/1951 31634 Transfer out to: 70D Basingstoke    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 7w/e 27/06/1951 31635 Transfer out to: 71B Bournemouth    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 7w/e 27/06/1951 31636 Transfer out to: 72B Salisbury    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 7w/e 27/06/1951 31828 Transfer out to: 73B Bricklayers Arms    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 7w/e 27/06/1951 31829 Transfer out to: 73B Bricklayers Arms    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 7w/e 27/06/1951 34050 Transfer out to: 72B Salisbury    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 7w/e 27/06/1951 34051 Transfer out to: 72B Salisbury    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 7w/e 27/06/1951 34052 Transfer out to: 72B Salisbury    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 7w/e 27/06/1951 34053 Transfer out to: 72B Salisbury    
Steam Large Hoppers 4-4-0 m/e 07/1951 30436 Condemned      
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 m/e 10/1951 30704 Condemned      
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 m/e 10/1951 30716 Condemned      
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 4w/e 06/10/1951 30045 Transfer in from: FRA Fratton    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 06/10/1951 34031 Transfer in from: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 06/10/1951 42099 Transfer in from: 75F Tunbridge Wells West    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 06/10/1951 42103 Transfer in from: 75F Tunbridge Wells West    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 06/10/1951 42105 Transfer in from: 75F Tunbridge Wells West    
Steam O2 0-4-4T 4w/e 06/10/1951 30192 Transfer out to: 72F Wadebridge    
Steam O2 0-4-4T 4w/e 06/10/1951 30230 Transfer out to: 71C Dorchester    
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 4w/e 06/10/1951 30724 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 4w/e 06/10/1951 30725 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 4w/e 06/10/1951 31851 Transfer out to: 71D Fratton    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 4w/e 06/10/1951 31852 Transfer out to: 71D Fratton    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 4w/e 06/10/1951 31853 Transfer out to: 73B Bricklayers Arms    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 4w/e 06/10/1951 31855 Transfer out to: 73B Bricklayers Arms    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 4w/e 06/10/1951 31856 Transfer out to: 73C Hither Green    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 06/10/1951 34031 Transfer out to: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 06/10/1951 34033 Transfer out to: 72D Plymouth Friary    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 21/01/1952 42099 Transfer out to: 75E Three Bridges    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 21/01/1952 42103 Transfer out to: 75A Brighton    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 21/01/1952 42105 Transfer out to: 75A Brighton    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 4w/e 19/03/1952 30676 Transfer in from: 9E Nine Elms    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 19/03/1952 34034 Transfer in from: 72D Plymouth Friary    
Steam Merchant Navy 4-6-2 4w/e 19/03/1952 35025 Transfer in from:        
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 4w/e 19/03/1952 30030 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 4w/e 19/03/1952 30124 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T m/e 05/1952 41313 1st Allocation        
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T m/e 05/1952 41314 1st Allocation        
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T m/e 05/1952 41315 1st Allocation        
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 25/06/1952 82010 1st Allocation        
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 9w/e 30/06/1952 34057 Transfer in from: 91S To Southern Region    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 9w/e 30/06/1952 41313 Transfer in from: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 9w/e 30/06/1952 41314 Transfer in from: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 9w/e 30/06/1952 41315 Transfer in from: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 9w/e 30/06/1952 30245 Transfer out to: 72E Barnstaple Junction    
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 9w/e 30/06/1952 30707 Transfer out to: 70D Basingstoke    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 9w/e 30/06/1952 31840 Transfer out to: 72E Barnstaple Junction    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 9w/e 30/06/1952 31841 Transfer out to: 72E Barnstaple Junction    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 9w/e 30/06/1952 31842 Transfer out to: 72E Barnstaple Junction    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 9w/e 30/06/1952 34054 Transfer out to: 72B Salisbury    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 9w/e 30/06/1952 34055 Transfer out to: 72B Salisbury    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 9w/e 30/06/1952 41313 Transfer out to: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 9w/e 30/06/1952 41314 Transfer out to: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 9w/e 30/06/1952 41315 Transfer out to: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 01/07/1952 82011 1st Allocation        
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 04/07/1952 82012 1st Allocation        
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 09/07/1952 82013 1st Allocation        
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 08/08/1952 82017 1st Allocation        
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 6w/e 13/08/1952 30717 Transfer out to: 72E Barnstaple Junction    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 6w/e 13/08/1952 31844 Transfer out to: 71D Fratton    
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 08/09/1952 82018 1st Allocation        
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 26/09/1952 82019 1st Allocation        
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 8w/e 07/10/1952 30707 Transfer in from: 70D Basingstoke    
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 8w/e 07/10/1952 30708 Transfer in from: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 8w/e 07/10/1952 30717 Transfer in from: 72E Barnstaple Junction    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 8w/e 07/10/1952 31840 Transfer in from: 72E Barnstaple Junction    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 8w/e 07/10/1952 31841 Transfer in from: 72E Barnstaple Junction    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 8w/e 07/10/1952 30040 Transfer out to: 72D Plymouth Friary    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 8w/e 07/10/1952 30133 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 8w/e 07/10/1952 30320 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 8w/e 07/10/1952 30321 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 8w/e 07/10/1952 30376 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 8w/e 07/10/1952 30708 Transfer out to: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam Jumbos 0-6-0 5w/e 11/12/1952 30575 Transfer in from: GFD Guildford    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 5w/e 11/12/1952 31842 Transfer in from: 72E Barnstaple Junction    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 5w/e 11/12/1952 31837 Transfer out to: 72C Yeovil Town    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 5w/e 11/12/1952 31843 Transfer out to: 72E Barnstaple Junction    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 5w/e 14/02/1953 31837 Transfer in from: 72C Yeovil Town    
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 5w/e 14/02/1953 30707 Transfer out to: 72C Yeovil Town    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 5w/e 14/02/1953 41315 Transfer out to: 72D Plymouth Friary    
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 5w/e 14/02/1953 82012 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 6w/e 27/03/1953 30023 Transfer out to: 71D Fratton    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 8w/e 20/07/1953 30023 Transfer in from: 71D Fratton    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 8w/e 20/07/1953 30676 Transfer in from: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 8w/e 20/07/1953 30727 Transfer in from: 71B Bournemouth    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 8w/e 20/07/1953 31851 Transfer in from: 71D Fratton    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 8w/e 20/07/1953 30356 Transfer out to: 71D Fratton    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 8w/e 20/07/1953 30357 Transfer out to: 71D Fratton    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 8w/e 20/07/1953 30375 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 8w/e 20/07/1953 30676 Transfer out to: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 8w/e 20/07/1953 31845 Transfer out to: 72E Barnstaple Junction    
Steam O2 0-4-4T 5w/e 24/08/1953 30224 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam S15 4-6-0 4w/e 01/10/1953 30846 Transfer in from: 72B Salisbury    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 4w/e 01/10/1953 31844 Transfer in from: 72E Barnstaple Junction    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 4w/e 01/10/1953 31845 Transfer in from: 72E Barnstaple Junction    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 4w/e 10/12/1953 30374 Transfer out to: 70E Reading (S.R.)    
Steam O2 0-4-4T 4w/e 30/12/1953 30193 Transfer out to: 70B Feltham    
Steam O2 0-4-4T 4w/e 08/02/1954 30193 Transfer in from: 70B Feltham    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 4w/e 08/02/1954 30374 Transfer in from: 70E Reading (S.R.)    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 4w/e 08/02/1954 30667 Transfer in from: 70E Reading (S.R.)    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 19/03/1954 34069 Transfer in from: BAT Stewarts Lane    
Steam Merchant Navy 4-6-2 4w/e 19/03/1954 35013 Transfer in from: 9E Nine Elms    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 19/03/1954 34017 Transfer out to: 73A Stewarts Lane    
Steam Merchant Navy 4-6-2 4w/e 19/03/1954 35005 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam Merchant Navy 4-6-2 8w/e 13/05/1954 35014 Transfer in from: 9E Nine Elms    
Steam Merchant Navy 4-6-2 8w/e 13/05/1954 35002 Transfer out to: 71B Bournemouth    
Steam Merchant Navy 4-6-2 6w/e 18/06/1954 35002 Transfer in from: 71B Bournemouth    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 6w/e 18/06/1954 30041 Transfer out to: 70B Feltham    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 6w/e 18/06/1954 30042 Transfer out to: 70B Feltham    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 6w/e 18/06/1954 31842 Transfer out to: 72E Barnstaple Junction    
Steam Merchant Navy 4-6-2 6w/e 18/06/1954 35025 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam Merchant Navy 4-6-2 4w/e 20/08/1954 35008 Transfer in from: 71B Bournemouth    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 20/08/1954 41296 Transfer in from:        
Steam Merchant Navy 4-6-2 4w/e 20/08/1954 35014 Transfer out to: 71B Bournemouth    
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 29/09/1954 82020 1st Allocation        
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 06/10/1954 82021 1st Allocation        
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 4w/e 09/10/1954 82020 Transfer out to: 2B Nuneaton    
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 4w/e 09/10/1954 82021 Transfer out to: 2B Nuneaton    
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 15/10/1954 82022 1st Allocation        
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 22/10/1954 82023 1st Allocation        
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 29/10/1954 82024 1st Allocation        
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 05/11/1954 82025 1st Allocation        
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 06/11/1954 34056 Transfer out to: 72B Salisbury    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 06/11/1954 34057 Transfer out to: 72B Salisbury    
Steam Black Motors 0-6-0 4w/e 11/12/1954 30315 Transfer in from: SAL Salisbury    
Steam Black Motors 0-6-0 4w/e 11/12/1954 30691 Transfer in from: SAL Salisbury    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 11/12/1954 34056 Transfer in from: 72B Salisbury    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 11/12/1954 34057 Transfer in from: 72B Salisbury    
Steam Jumbos 0-6-0 4w/e 11/12/1954 30575 Transfer out to: 70C Guildford    
Steam Jumbos 0-6-0 4w/e 11/12/1954 30580 Transfer out to: 70C Guildford    
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 4w/e 11/12/1954 30706 Transfer out to: 71B Bournemouth    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 9w/e 08/02/1955 31851 Transfer out to: 73B Bricklayers Arms    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 5w/e 11/03/1955 31842 Transfer in from: 72E Barnstaple Junction    
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 5w/e 11/03/1955 30727 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 5w/e 11/03/1955 41296 Transfer out to: 73A Stewarts Lane    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 5w/e 11/03/1955 41313 Transfer out to: 75E Three Bridges    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 5w/e 11/03/1955 41314 Transfer out to: 73B Bricklayers Arms    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 6w/e 21/06/1955 41297 Transfer in from: 75E Three Bridges    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 6w/e 21/06/1955 41306 Transfer in from: 73E Faversham    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 6w/e 21/06/1955 41307 Transfer in from: 75E Three Bridges    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 6w/e 21/06/1955 31842 Transfer out to: 72E Barnstaple Junction    
Steam Z 0-8-0T 5w/e 12/08/1955 30956 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Steam Z 0-8-0T 5w/e 16/09/1955 30956 Transfer out to: 72B Salisbury    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 m/e 10/1955 75070 1st Allocation        
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 m/e 10/1955 75071 1st Allocation        
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 10/10/1955 34059 Transfer out to: 72B Salisbury    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 10/10/1955 41297 Transfer out to: 72E Barnstaple Junction    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 m/e 11/1955 75072 1st Allocation        
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 m/e 11/1955 75073 1st Allocation        
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 3w/e 01/11/1955 31848 Transfer out to: 74A Ashford    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 m/e 12/1955 75074 1st Allocation        
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 m/e 12/1955 75075 1st Allocation        
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 m/e 12/1955 75076 1st Allocation        
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 m/e 12/1955 75077 1st Allocation        
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 m/e 01/1956 75078 1st Allocation        
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 m/e 01/1956 75079 1st Allocation        
Steam Z 0-8-0T 7w/e 20/04/1956 30950 Transfer in from: 74A Ashford    
Steam Z 0-8-0T 7w/e 20/04/1956 30956 Transfer in from: 72B Salisbury    
Steam O2 0-4-4T 6w/e 15/06/1956 30183 Transfer in from: 72D Plymouth Friary    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 6w/e 15/06/1956 31635 Transfer in from: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 6w/e 15/06/1956 31804 Transfer in from: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 6w/e 15/06/1956 30671 Transfer out to: 72E Barnstaple Junction    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 6w/e 15/06/1956 75070 Transfer out to: 71G Bath Green Park (S&D)    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 6w/e 15/06/1956 75071 Transfer out to: 71G Bath Green Park (S&D)    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 6w/e 15/06/1956 75072 Transfer out to: 71G Bath Green Park (S&D)    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 6w/e 15/06/1956 75073 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 6w/e 15/06/1956 75074 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 6w/e 15/06/1956 75075 Transfer out to: 70D Basingstoke    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 6w/e 15/06/1956 75076 Transfer out to: 70D Basingstoke    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 6w/e 15/06/1956 75077 Transfer out to: 70D Basingstoke    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 6w/e 15/06/1956 75078 Transfer out to: 70D Basingstoke    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 6w/e 15/06/1956 75079 Transfer out to: 70D Basingstoke    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 3w/e 17/11/1956 31842 Transfer in from: 72E Barnstaple Junction    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 3w/e 17/11/1956 31843 Transfer in from: 72E Barnstaple Junction    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 3w/e 17/11/1956 30025 Transfer out to: 72B Salisbury    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 3w/e 17/11/1956 30374 Transfer out to: 72B Salisbury    
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 3w/e 17/11/1956 30705 Transfer out to: 70C Guildford    
Steam Z 0-8-0T 4w/e 17/12/1956 30954 Transfer out to: 72B Salisbury    
Steam Merchant Navy 4-6-2 6w/e 25/01/1957 35026 Transfer in from:        
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 6w/e 25/01/1957 31635 Transfer out to: 70C Guildford    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 6w/e 25/01/1957 31804 Transfer out to: 70F Fratton    
Steam Merchant Navy 4-6-2 6w/e 25/01/1957 35001 Transfer out to: 73A Stewarts Lane    
Steam El Radials 0-6-2T m/e 04/1957 32695 Condemned      
Steam Merchant Navy 4-6-2 6w/e 01/04/1957 35009 Transfer in from: SAL Salisbury    
Steam Merchant Navy 4-6-2 6w/e 01/04/1957 35004 Transfer out to: 72B Salisbury    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 9w/e 12/06/1957 30374 Transfer in from: 72B Salisbury    
Steam Merchant Navy 4-6-2 9w/e 12/06/1957 35011 Transfer in from: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 9w/e 12/06/1957 41318 Transfer in from: 74B Ramsgate    
Steam O2 0-4-4T 9w/e 12/06/1957 30193 Transfer out to: 72D Plymouth Friary    
Steam O2 0-4-4T 9w/e 12/06/1957 30199 Transfer out to: 72D Plymouth Friary    
Steam Merchant Navy 4-6-2 9w/e 12/06/1957 35026 Transfer out to: 71B Bournemouth    
Steam O2 0-4-4T 5w/e 19/07/1957 30199 Transfer in from: 72D Plymouth Friary    
Steam O2 0-4-4T 5w/e 19/07/1957 30183 Transfer out to: 72D Plymouth Friary    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 7w/e 08/10/1957 34075 Transfer in from: 74B Ramsgate    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 7w/e 08/10/1957 34076 Transfer in from: 74B Ramsgate    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 7w/e 08/10/1957 34081 Transfer in from:        
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 7w/e 08/10/1957 34086 Transfer in from:        
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 7w/e 08/10/1957 34001 Transfer out to: 73B Bricklayers Arms    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 7w/e 08/10/1957 34003 Transfer out to: 73B Bricklayers Arms    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 7w/e 08/10/1957 34013 Transfer out to: 73B Bricklayers Arms    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 7w/e 08/10/1957 34025 Transfer out to: 73B Bricklayers Arms    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 7w/e 08/10/1957 34027 Transfer out to: 73B Bricklayers Arms    
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 m/e 12/1957 30708 Condemned      
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 14/01/1958 34035 Transfer in from: 72D Plymouth Friary    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 14/01/1958 34036 Transfer in from: 72D Plymouth Friary    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 14/01/1958 34037 Transfer in from: 72D Plymouth Friary    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 14/01/1958 34038 Transfer in from: 72D Plymouth Friary    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 14/01/1958 34021 Transfer out to: 74B Ramsgate    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 14/01/1958 34022 Transfer out to: 74B Ramsgate    
Steam O2 0-4-4T m/e 02/1958 30233 Condemned      
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 24/02/1958 34072 Transfer in from:        
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 24/02/1958 34074 Transfer in from: 74C Dover    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 24/02/1958 34079 Transfer in from:        
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 24/02/1958 34104 Transfer in from: 74C Dover    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 24/02/1958 34106 Transfer in from:        
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 24/02/1958 34108 Transfer in from:        
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 24/02/1958 34109 Transfer in from:        
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 24/02/1958 34004 Transfer out to: 73B Bricklayers Arms    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 24/02/1958 34014 Transfer out to: 73B Bricklayers Arms    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 24/02/1958 34016 Transfer out to: 74B Ramsgate    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 24/02/1958 34026 Transfer out to: 74B Ramsgate    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 24/02/1958 34037 Transfer out to: 74B Ramsgate    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 24/02/1958 34086 Transfer out to: 74C Dover    
Steam Black Motors 0-6-0 4w/e 22/03/1958 30317 Transfer in from: SAL Salisbury    
Steam Black Motors 0-6-0 4w/e 22/03/1958 30315 Transfer out to: 72B Salisbury    
Steam Jumbos 0-6-0 m/e 04/1958 30564 Condemned      
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 q/e 06/06/1958 30726 Transfer in from: 71D Fratton    
Steam Merchant Navy 4-6-2 q/e 06/06/1958 35002 Transfer out to: 71B Bournemouth    
Steam O2 0-4-4T 3w/e 13/10/1958 30182 Transfer in from: 72C Yeovil Town    
Steam Z 0-8-0T 3w/e 13/10/1958 30955 Transfer in from: 74A Ashford    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 3w/e 13/10/1958 31626 Transfer in from: 72C Yeovil Town    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 3w/e 13/10/1958 31790 Transfer in from: YEO Yeovil Town    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 3w/e 13/10/1958 31791 Transfer in from: YEO Yeovil Town    
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 m/e 11/1958 30712 Condemned      
Steam El Radials 0-6-2T m/e 01/1959 32124 Condemned      
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T m/e 02/1959 30046 Condemned      
Steam El Radials 0-6-2T m/e 02/1959 32135 Condemned      
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T w/e 11/03/1959 30027 Transfer in from: 70C Guildford    
Steam Black Motors 0-6-0 w/e 11/03/1959 30327 Transfer in from: 72B Salisbury    
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 w/e 11/03/1959 30702 Transfer in from: 72B Salisbury    
Steam Z 0-8-0T w/e 11/03/1959 30953 Transfer in from: 71H Templecombe (S&D)    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 w/e 11/03/1959 34011 Transfer in from: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 w/e 11/03/1959 34063 Transfer in from: BAT Stewarts Lane    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 w/e 11/03/1959 34110 Transfer in from: 71B Bournemouth    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T w/e 11/03/1959 30032 Transfer out to: 70B Feltham    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 w/e 11/03/1959 31626 Transfer out to: 72C Yeovil Town    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 w/e 11/03/1959 34028 Transfer out to: 71B Bournemouth    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 w/e 11/03/1959 34029 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 w/e 11/03/1959 34031 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam Z 0-8-0T 3w/e 01/05/1959 30957 Transfer in from: 72B Salisbury    
Steam Merchant Navy 4-6-2 3w/e 01/05/1959 35026 Transfer in from: 71B Bournemouth    
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 6w/e 14/06/1959 30338 Transfer in from: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 6w/e 14/06/1959 30718 Transfer in from: 9E Nine Elms    
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 6w/e 14/06/1959 30719 Transfer in from: BM Bournemouth    
Steam Z 0-8-0T 6w/e 14/06/1959 30951 Transfer in from: 74A Ashford    
Steam Z 0-8-0T 6w/e 14/06/1959 30952 Transfer in from: 74A Ashford    
Steam Z 0-8-0T 6w/e 14/06/1959 30954 Transfer in from: 72B Salisbury    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 6w/e 14/06/1959 31850 Transfer in from: FAV Faversham    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 6w/e 14/06/1959 31851 Transfer in from: 73B Bricklayers Arms    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 6w/e 14/06/1959 31852 Transfer in from: 73E Faversham    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 6w/e 14/06/1959 31853 Transfer in from: 73B Bricklayers Arms    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 6w/e 14/06/1959 31860 Transfer in from: 73C Hither Green    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 6w/e 14/06/1959 34064 Transfer in from: 9E Nine Elms    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 6w/e 14/06/1959 34065 Transfer in from: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 6w/e 14/06/1959 34107 Transfer in from:        
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 6w/e 14/06/1959 31409 Transfer out to: 73F Ashford    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 6w/e 14/06/1959 31790 Transfer out to: 72C Yeovil Town    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 6w/e 14/06/1959 31791 Transfer out to: 72C Yeovil Town    
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 m/e 08/1959 30711 Condemned      
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 m/e 08/1959 30726 Condemned      
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 4w/e 19/08/1959 30048 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 4w/e 19/08/1959 30313 Transfer in from: 72B Salisbury    
Steam O2 0-4-4T m/e 09/1959 30232 Condemned      
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T m/e 10/1959 30374 Condemned      
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 m/e 10/1959 30702 Condemned      
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T m/e 11/1959 30027 Condemned      
Steam El Radials 0-6-2T m/e 11/1959 32697 Condemned      
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 5w/e 26/11/1959 4666 Transfer in from: 87C Danygraig    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 5w/e 26/11/1959 4694 Transfer in from:        
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 5w/e 26/11/1959 9756 Transfer in from:        
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 5w/e 26/11/1959 31809 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 5w/e 26/11/1959 31850 Transfer out to: 75B Redhill    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 5w/e 26/11/1959 31851 Transfer out to: 75B Redhill    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 5w/e 26/11/1959 31852 Transfer out to: 75B Redhill    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T m/e 12/1959 30323 Condemned      
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 5w/e 31/12/1959 3633 Transfer in from: 72F Wadebridge    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 5w/e 31/12/1959 3679 Transfer in from: 72F Wadebridge    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 5w/e 31/12/1959 4666 Transfer out to: 72F Wadebridge    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 5w/e 31/12/1959 4694 Transfer out to: 72F Wadebridge    
Steam O2 0-4-4T m/e 01/1960 30182 Condemned      
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 6w/e 09/02/1960 41308 Transfer in from: 73F Ashford    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 6w/e 09/02/1960 41309 Transfer in from: 73F Ashford    
Steam Merchant Navy 4-6-2 4w/e 10/03/1960 35010 Transfer in from: 71B Bournemouth    
Steam Merchant Navy 4-6-2 4w/e 10/03/1960 35022 Transfer in from: 71B Bournemouth    
Steam Merchant Navy 4-6-2 4w/e 10/03/1960 35025 Transfer in from: 71B Bournemouth    
Steam Merchant Navy 4-6-2 4w/e 10/03/1960 35008 Transfer out to: 71B Bournemouth    
Steam Merchant Navy 4-6-2 4w/e 10/03/1960 35011 Transfer out to: 71B Bournemouth    
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 4w/e 06/05/1960 30729 Transfer in from: 72B Salisbury    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 06/05/1960 3633 Transfer out to: 73H Dover    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 06/05/1960 9756 Transfer out to: 71G Weymouth Radipole (GWR)    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 6w/e 05/10/1960 30125 Transfer in from: ELH Eastleigh    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 6w/e 05/10/1960 30023 Transfer out to: 72E Barnstaple Junction    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 24/11/1960 34084 Transfer in from: 74C Dover    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 24/11/1960 34097 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 24/11/1960 34098 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 24/11/1960 34038 Transfer out to: 75A Brighton    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 24/11/1960 34057 Transfer out to: 75A Brighton    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 24/11/1960 34061 Transfer out to: 73H Dover    
Steam Radial Tanks 4-4-2T m/e 01/1961 30584 Condemned      
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T m/e 02/1961 30667 Condemned      
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 m/e 10/02/1961 31855 Transfer in from: 73C Hither Green    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 m/e 10/02/1961 31856 Transfer in from: 73C Hither Green    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 m/e 10/02/1961 31857 Transfer in from: 70B Feltham    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 m/e 10/02/1961 31874 Transfer in from: 73B Bricklayers Arms    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 m/e 10/02/1961 31875 Transfer in from: 73B Bricklayers Arms    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 m/e 10/02/1961 34066 Transfer in from: RAM Ramsgate    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 m/e 10/02/1961 34078 Transfer in from: 73B Bricklayers Arms    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T m/e 10/02/1961 41292 Transfer in from:        
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T m/e 10/02/1961 41299 Transfer in from:        
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 m/e 03/1961 30718 Condemned      
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 m/e 03/1961 30719 Condemned      
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 m/e 03/1961 30729 Condemned      
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 5w/e 18/03/1961 30120 Transfer in from: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 m/e 04/1961 30338 Condemned      
Steam Black Motors 0-6-0 m/e 05/1961 30327 Condemned      
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 3w/e 26/05/1961 31901 Transfer in from: 73J Tonbridge    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 3w/e 26/05/1961 31902 Transfer in from: 73J Tonbridge    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 3w/e 26/05/1961 31903 Transfer in from: 73J Tonbridge    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 3w/e 26/05/1961 31904 Transfer in from: 73J Tonbridge    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 3w/e 26/05/1961 34086 Transfer in from: 73A Stewarts Lane    
Steam Standard Class 2 Tank 2-6-2T 3w/e 26/05/1961 84020 Transfer in from: 73A Stewarts Lane    
Steam Standard Class 2 Tank 2-6-2T 3w/e 26/05/1961 84021 Transfer in from: 73B Bricklayers Arms    
Steam Standard Class 2 Tank 2-6-2T 3w/e 26/05/1961 84022 Transfer in from: 73B Bricklayers Arms    
Steam Standard Class 2 Tank 2-6-2T 3w/e 26/05/1961 84023 Transfer in from: 73B Bricklayers Arms    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T w/e 24/06/1961 41238 Transfer in from: 6G Llandudno Junction    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T w/e 24/06/1961 41270 Transfer in from: 14D Neasden    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T w/e 24/06/1961 41272 Transfer in from: 14D Neasden    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T w/e 24/06/1961 41284 Transfer in from: 14D Neasden    
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 m/e 07/1961 30313 Condemned      
Steam Black Motors 0-6-0 m/e 07/1961 30317 Condemned      
Steam Radial Tanks 4-4-2T m/e 07/1961 30582 Condemned      
Steam Radial Tanks 4-4-2T m/e 07/1961 30583 Condemned      
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T m/e 07/1961 30669 Condemned      
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T m/e 07/1961 30676 Condemned      
Steam Black Motors 0-6-0 m/e 07/1961 30691 Condemned      
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 m/e 07/1961 30715 Condemned      
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 m/e 07/1961 30717 Condemned      
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 7w/e 23/08/1961 34109 Transfer in from: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 7w/e 23/08/1961 34109 Transfer out to: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T m/e 09/1961 30044 Condemned      
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T m/e 09/1961 30668 Condemned      
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T w/e 16/09/1961 41320 Transfer in from: 16D Annesley    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T w/e 16/09/1961 41321 Transfer in from: 15C Leicester Midland    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T w/e 16/09/1961 41322 Transfer in from: 6G Llandudno Junction    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T w/e 16/09/1961 41323 Transfer in from: 24J Lancaster Green Ayre    
Steam Standard Class 2 Tank 2-6-2T w/e 16/09/1961 84020 Transfer out to: 6G Llandudno Junction    
Steam Standard Class 2 Tank 2-6-2T w/e 16/09/1961 84021 Transfer out to: 6G Llandudno Junction    
Steam Standard Class 2 Tank 2-6-2T w/e 16/09/1961 84022 Transfer out to: 6G Llandudno Junction    
Steam Standard Class 2 Tank 2-6-2T w/e 16/09/1961 84023 Transfer out to: 24J Lancaster Green Ayre    
Steam Black Motors 0-6-0 2w/e 10/10/1961 30689 Transfer in from: FEL Feltham    
Steam Black Motors 0-6-0 2w/e 10/10/1961 30697 Transfer in from: 70C Guildford    
Steam Black Motors 0-6-0 2w/e 10/10/1961 30700 Transfer in from: 70C Guildford    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 2w/e 10/10/1961 30021 Transfer out to: 72B Salisbury    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 2w/e 10/10/1961 31901 Transfer out to: 75C Norwood Junction    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 2w/e 10/10/1961 31902 Transfer out to: 75C Norwood Junction    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 2w/e 10/10/1961 31903 Transfer out to: 75C Norwood Junction    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 2w/e 10/10/1961 31904 Transfer out to: 75C Norwood Junction    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 m/e 09/11/1961 31409 Transfer in from: 73F Ashford    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 m/e 09/11/1961 31848 Transfer in from: 74A Ashford    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 m/e 09/11/1961 34070 Transfer in from: 73F Ashford    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 m/e 09/11/1961 34083 Transfer in from: 73F Ashford    
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 m/e 09/11/1961 30120 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam O2 0-4-4T m/e 09/11/1961 30199 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 m/e 09/11/1961 34034 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 m/e 09/11/1961 34104 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 4w/e 01/02/1962 31818 Transfer in from: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 4w/e 05/03/1962 31406 Transfer in from: 71G Weymouth Radipole (GWR)    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 28/05/1962 34020 Transfer in from: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 4w/e 28/05/1962 80035 Transfer in from: 73F Ashford    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 4w/e 28/05/1962 80036 Transfer in from: 73F Ashford    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 4w/e 28/05/1962 80037 Transfer in from: 73J Tonbridge    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 28/05/1962 34064 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 28/05/1962 34097 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 28/05/1962 34098 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 5w/e 02/07/1962 80037 Transfer in from: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 5w/e 02/07/1962 80038 Transfer in from: 73J Tonbridge    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 5w/e 02/07/1962 80039 Transfer in from: 73J Tonbridge    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 5w/e 02/07/1962 80040 Transfer in from: 73J Tonbridge    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 5w/e 02/07/1962 80041 Transfer in from: 73J Tonbridge    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 5w/e 02/07/1962 80042 Transfer in from: 73J Tonbridge    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 5w/e 02/07/1962 80043 Transfer in from: 73J Tonbridge    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 5w/e 02/07/1962 80059 Transfer in from: 73J Tonbridge    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 5w/e 02/07/1962 80064 Transfer in from: 73J Tonbridge    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 5w/e 02/07/1962 80037 Transfer out to: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 4w/e 24/09/1962 82010 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 4w/e 24/09/1962 82011 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 4w/e 24/09/1962 82013 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 4w/e 24/09/1962 82017 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 4w/e 24/09/1962 82018 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 4w/e 24/09/1962 82019 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 4w/e 24/09/1962 82022 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 4w/e 24/09/1962 82023 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 4w/e 24/09/1962 82024 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 4w/e 24/09/1962 82025 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam Z 0-8-0T w/e 20/10/1962 30950 Condemned      
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 4w/e 22/10/1962 31830 Transfer out to: 75A Brighton    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 4w/e 22/10/1962 31831 Transfer out to: 75A Brighton    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 4w/e 22/10/1962 31832 Transfer out to: 75A Brighton    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 4w/e 22/10/1962 31833 Transfer out to: 75A Brighton    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 4w/e 22/10/1962 31857 Transfer out to: 70C Guildford    
Steam Black Motors 0-6-0 w/e 17/11/1962 30689 Condemned      
Steam Black Motors 0-6-0 w/e 17/11/1962 30697 Condemned      
Steam Black Motors 0-6-0 w/e 17/11/1962 30700 Condemned      
Steam Z 0-8-0T w/e 17/11/1962 30957 Condemned      
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 w/e 17/11/1962 31409 Condemned      
Steam Z 0-8-0T w/e 24/11/1962 30951 Condemned      
Steam Z 0-8-0T w/e 24/11/1962 30952 Condemned      
Steam Z 0-8-0T m/e 12/1962 30955 Condemned      
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T w/e 08/12/1962 30045 Condemned      
Steam Z 0-8-0T w/e 08/12/1962 30954 Condemned      
Steam Z 0-8-0T w/e 15/12/1962 30953 Condemned      
Steam Q 0-6-0 4w/e 17/12/1962 30530 Transfer in from: ELH Eastleigh    
Steam Q 0-6-0 4w/e 17/12/1962 30531 Transfer in from: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam W 2-6-4T 4w/e 17/12/1962 31917 Transfer in from: NORW Norwood Junction    
Steam Z 0-8-0T 22/12/1962 30956 Condemned      
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 30/12/1962 30125 Condemned      
Steam W 2-6-4T 3w/e 30/01/1963 31917 Transfer out to: 70B Feltham    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 09/02/1963 41206 Transfer in from: 91W To Western Region / GWR    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 09/02/1963 4666 Transfer in from: 72F Wadebridge    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 09/02/1963 4694 Transfer in from: 72F Wadebridge    
Steam S15 4-6-0 4w/e 09/02/1963 30846 Condemned      
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT m/e 03/1963 3679 Condemned      
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T w/e 03/03/1963 30024 Condemned      
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 09/03/1963 4655 Transfer in from: 83B Taunton    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 01/04/1963 41299 Transfer out to: 75A Brighton    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 06/04/1963 41291 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Steam 64xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 06/04/1963 6400 Transfer in from: 83D Laira    
Steam 64xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 06/04/1963 6430 Transfer in from: 88H Tondu    
Steam Motor Tanks 0-4-4T 4w/e 19/04/1963 30048 Transfer out to: 71B Bournemouth    
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 4w/e 04/05/1963 82001 Transfer in from: 86C Hereford    
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 4w/e 04/05/1963 82002 Transfer in from: 86C Hereford    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 27/05/1963 34063 Transfer out to: 75A Brighton    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 27/05/1963 34084 Transfer out to: 71B Bournemouth    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 m/e 06/1963 34035 Condemned      
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 m/e 06/1963 34074 Condemned      
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 29/06/1963 4666 Transfer out to: 72E Barnstaple Junction    
Steam S15 4-6-0 m/e 07/1963 30845 Condemned      
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T w/e 20/07/1963 41272 Transfer out to: 84D Leamington    
Steam Q 0-6-0 4w/e 22/07/1963 30530 Transfer out to: 71B Bournemouth    
Steam Q 0-6-0 4w/e 22/07/1963 30531 Transfer out to: 75E Three Bridges    
Steam 2251 0-6-0 4w/e 27/07/1963 2241 Transfer in from: 85C Hereford    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 27/07/1963 4692 Transfer in from: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam 64xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 27/07/1963 6412 Transfer in from: 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport)    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 4w/e 27/07/1963 80038 Transfer out to: 72C Yeovil Town    
Steam 2251 0-6-0 5w/e 31/08/1963 2214 Transfer in from: 89A Shrewsbury    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 2w/e 31/08/1963 31812 Transfer in from: 70C Guildford    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 2w/e 31/08/1963 31821 Transfer in from: 70C Guildford    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 2w/e 31/08/1963 31854 Transfer in from: 73A Stewarts Lane    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 2w/e 31/08/1963 31859 Transfer in from: 70C Guildford    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 2w/e 31/08/1963 3759 Transfer in from: 71G Weymouth Radipole (GWR)    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 2w/e 31/08/1963 4610 Transfer in from: 71G Weymouth Radipole (GWR)    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 2w/e 31/08/1963 4616 Transfer in from: 70E Salisbury    
Steam 2251 0-6-0 5w/e 31/08/1963 2241 Transfer out to: 86C Hereford    
Steam S15 4-6-0 2w/e 31/08/1963 30841 Transfer out to: 70B Feltham    
Steam S15 4-6-0 2w/e 31/08/1963 30842 Transfer out to: 70B Feltham    
Steam S15 4-6-0 2w/e 31/08/1963 30843 Transfer out to: 70B Feltham    
Steam S15 4-6-0 2w/e 31/08/1963 30844 Transfer out to: 70B Feltham    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 2w/e 31/08/1963 31818 Transfer out to: 75D Stewarts Lane    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 28/09/1963 41302 Transfer in from: 83D Laira    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 28/09/1963 41315 Transfer in from: 83D Laira    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 28/09/1963 41316 Transfer in from: 83D Laira    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 28/09/1963 41317 Transfer in from: 83D Laira    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 28/09/1963 4666 Transfer in from: 72E Barnstaple Junction    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 4w/e 28/09/1963 73161 Transfer in from: 56A Wakefield    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 4w/e 28/09/1963 73162 Transfer in from: 56A Wakefield    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 4w/e 28/09/1963 80038 Transfer in from: 72C Yeovil Town    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 m/e 10/1963 31847 Condemned      
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T m/e 10/1963 41292 Condemned      
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T m/e 10/1963 41318 Condemned      
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 m/e 11/1963 31860 Condemned      
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 m/e 11/1963 34011 Condemned      
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 m/e 11/1963 34069 Condemned      
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 m/e 11/1963 34110 Condemned      
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T m/e 11/1963 41302 Condemned      
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 02/11/1963 34054 Transfer in from: 72B Salisbury    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 02/11/1963 34061 Transfer in from: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 02/11/1963 34084 Transfer in from: 71B Bournemouth    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 02/11/1963 D3517 Transfer in from: 83C Exeter    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 02/11/1963 D3519 Transfer in from: 83C Exeter    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 02/11/1963 D3521 Transfer in from: 83C Exeter    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 02/11/1963 D4129 Transfer in from: 83C Exeter    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 02/11/1963 D4130 Transfer in from: 83C Exeter    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 02/11/1963 D4162 Transfer in from: 83C Exeter    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 02/11/1963 4673 Transfer in from: 83C Exeter    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 4w/e 02/11/1963 73030 Transfer in from: 10C Patricroft    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 4w/e 02/11/1963 73044 Transfer in from: 10C Patricroft    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 4w/e 02/11/1963 73166 Transfer in from: 26F Patricroft    
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 4w/e 02/11/1963 82040 Transfer in from: 82E Bristol Barrow Road    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 m/e 11/11/1963 34024 Transfer out to: 70F Bournemouth    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 m/e 11/11/1963 34032 Transfer out to: 70E Salisbury    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 m/e 11/11/1963 34036 Transfer out to: 70E Salisbury    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 m/e 11/11/1963 34056 Transfer out to: 70E Salisbury    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 m/e 11/11/1963 34058 Transfer out to: 70D Eastleigh    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 m/e 11/11/1963 34060 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 m/e 11/11/1963 34108 Transfer out to: 70E Salisbury    
Steam 2251 0-6-0 4w/e 30/11/1963 2277 Transfer in from: 82E Bristol Barrow Road    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 30/11/1963 4673 Transfer out to: 83C Westbury    
Steam 64xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 30/11/1963 6400 Transfer out to: 83E Yeovil Town    
Steam 64xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 30/11/1963 6412 Transfer out to: 83E Yeovil Town    
Steam 64xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 30/11/1963 6430 Transfer out to: 83E Yeovil Town    
Steam 2251 0-6-0 m/e 12/1963 2277 Condemned      
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 m/e 12/1963 31836 Condemned      
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 m/e 12/1963 31839 Condemned      
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 m/e 12/1963 31844 Condemned      
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T m/e 12/1963 41306 Condemned      
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T m/e 12/1963 41309 Condemned      
Steam 2251 0-6-0 4w/e 28/12/1963 3205 Transfer in from: 86C Hereford    
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 4w/e 28/12/1963 82001 Transfer out to: 83B Taunton    
Steam S15 4-6-0 m/e 01/1964 30827 Condemned      
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 m/e 02/1964 31838 Condemned      
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 m/e 02/1964 31848 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T m/e 02/1964 82002 Condemned      
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 22/02/1964 41210 Transfer in from: 72E Barnstaple Junction    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 22/02/1964 4616 Transfer out to: 86G Pontypool Road    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 m/e 03/1964 31841 Condemned      
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 m/e 03/1964 31874 Condemned      
Steam Merchant Navy 4-6-2 m/e 02/03/1964 35022 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam Merchant Navy 4-6-2 m/e 02/03/1964 35026 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T m/e 02/03/1964 41210 Transfer out to: 70E Salisbury    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T m/e 02/03/1964 41315 Transfer out to: 70E Salisbury    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 m/e 04/1964 34065 Condemned      
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 m/e 04/1964 34075 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 6w/e 13/04/1964 75005 Transfer in from: 85B Gloucester Horton Road    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 6w/e 13/04/1964 75025 Transfer in from: 85B Gloucester Horton Road    
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 6w/e 13/04/1964 82035 Transfer in from: 82E Bristol Barrow Road    
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 6w/e 13/04/1964 82039 Transfer in from: 82E Bristol Barrow Road    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 m/e 05/1964 31821 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 3w/e 04/05/1964 75022 Transfer in from: 81F Oxford    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 06/05/1964 80040 Condemned      
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 25/05/1964 41238 Transfer out to: 70F Bournemouth    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 25/05/1964 41270 Transfer out to: 70F Bournemouth    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 m/e 06/1964 31854 Condemned      
Diesel 08 0-6-0 7w/e 22/06/1964 D3516 Transfer in from: 83D Laira    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 7w/e 22/06/1964 D3517 Transfer in from: 83D Exmouth Junction    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 7w/e 22/06/1964 41223 Transfer in from: 72E Barnstaple Junction    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 7w/e 22/06/1964 41224 Transfer in from: 72E Barnstaple Junction    
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 7w/e 22/06/1964 82030 Transfer in from: 83B Taunton    
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 7w/e 22/06/1964 82042 Transfer in from: 83B Taunton    
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 7w/e 22/06/1964 82044 Transfer in from: 83B Taunton    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 m/e 07/1964 31812 Condemned      
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 m/e 07/1964 31849 Condemned      
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 m/e 07/1964 31856 Condemned      
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T m/e 07/1964 41322 Condemned      
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T m/e 07/1964 41323 Condemned      
Steam Merchant Navy 4-6-2 4w/e 20/07/1964 35010 Transfer in from: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 m/e 20/07/1964 31842 Transfer out to: 70C Guildford    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 m/e 20/07/1964 34061 Transfer out to: 70D Eastleigh    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 m/e 20/07/1964 34072 Transfer out to: 70D Eastleigh    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 m/e 20/07/1964 34081 Transfer out to: 70D Eastleigh    
Steam Merchant Navy 4-6-2 m/e 20/07/1964 35003 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam Merchant Navy 4-6-2 4w/e 20/07/1964 35010 Transfer out to: 83D Exmouth Junction    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T m/e 20/07/1964 41316 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T m/e 20/07/1964 41320 Transfer out to: 70E Salisbury    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 m/e 08/1964 31875 Condemned      
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 m/e 08/1964 34062 Condemned      
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 m/e 08/1964 34070 Condemned      
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 m/e 08/1964 34083 Condemned      
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 m/e 09/1964 31406 Condemned      
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 m/e 09/1964 31834 Condemned      
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 m/e 09/1964 31835 Condemned      
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 m/e 09/1964 31837 Condemned      
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 m/e 09/1964 31840 Condemned      
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 m/e 09/1964 31843 Condemned      
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 m/e 09/1964 31845 Condemned      
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 m/e 09/1964 31846 Condemned      
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 m/e 09/1964 31853 Condemned      
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 m/e 09/1964 31855 Condemned      
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 m/e 09/1964 31859 Condemned      
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 m/e 09/1964 34020 Condemned      
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 m/e 09/1964 34054 Condemned      
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 m/e 09/1964 34078 Condemned      
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 m/e 09/1964 34106 Condemned      
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 m/e 09/1964 34107 Condemned      
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 m/e 09/1964 34109 Condemned      
Steam Merchant Navy 4-6-2 m/e 09/1964 35009 Condemned      
Steam Merchant Navy 4-6-2 m/e 09/1964 35025 Condemned      
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT m/e 09/1964 4692 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 07/09/1964 80038 Condemned      
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 m/e 14/09/1964 34002 Transfer out to: 70D Eastleigh    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 m/e 14/09/1964 34015 Transfer out to: 70E Salisbury    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 m/e 14/09/1964 34023 Transfer out to: 70D Eastleigh    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 m/e 14/09/1964 34066 Transfer out to: 70E Salisbury    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 m/e 14/09/1964 34076 Transfer out to: 70D Eastleigh    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 m/e 14/09/1964 34079 Transfer out to: 70D Eastleigh    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 m/e 14/09/1964 34084 Transfer out to: 70D Eastleigh    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 m/e 14/09/1964 34086 Transfer out to: 70D Eastleigh    
Steam Merchant Navy 4-6-2 m/e 14/09/1964 35010 Transfer out to: 70F Bournemouth    
Steam Merchant Navy 4-6-2 m/e 14/09/1964 35013 Transfer out to: 70F Bournemouth    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT m/e 10/1964 4610 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 6w/e 12/10/1964 75008 Transfer in from: 83G Templecombe (S&D)    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 6w/e 12/10/1964 9647 Transfer in from: 83B Taunton    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T m/e 12/10/1964 41224 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T m/e 12/10/1964 41284 Transfer out to: 70G Weymouth Radipole (GWR)    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 6w/e 12/10/1964 73030 Transfer out to: 82E Bristol Barrow Road    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 6w/e 12/10/1964 73166 Transfer out to: 83E Yeovil Town    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 6w/e 12/10/1964 80035 Transfer out to: 83E Yeovil Town    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 6w/e 12/10/1964 80043 Transfer out to: 83G Templecombe (S&D)    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 6w/e 12/10/1964 80059 Transfer out to: 83G Templecombe (S&D)    
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 6w/e 12/10/1964 82035 Transfer out to: 83E Yeovil Town    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 09/11/1964 80036 Condemned      
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T w/e 15/11/1964 41208 Transfer in from: 83F Barnstaple Junction    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T w/e 15/11/1964 41216 Transfer in from: 72E Barnstaple Junction    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T w/e 22/11/1964 41249 Transfer in from: 83F Barnstaple Junction    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T w/e 22/11/1964 41208 Transfer out to: 83G Templecombe (S&D)    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T m/e 12/1964 41317 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 m/e 12/1964 73161 Condemned      
Steam 2251 0-6-0 4w/e 27/12/1964 2214 Transfer in from: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam 2251 0-6-0 4w/e 27/12/1964 3205 Transfer in from: 83D Exmouth Junction    
Steam 2251 0-6-0 4w/e 27/12/1964 2214 Transfer out to: 83D Exmouth Junction    
Steam 2251 0-6-0 4w/e 27/12/1964 3205 Transfer out to: 83D Exmouth Junction    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 2w/e 10/01/1965 80035 Transfer in from: 83E Yeovil Town    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 2w/e 10/01/1965 73044 Transfer out to: 81F Oxford    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 2w/e 10/01/1965 73162 Transfer out to: 81F Oxford    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 2w/e 10/01/1965 80037 Transfer out to: 82F Bath Green Park (S&D)    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 2w/e 10/01/1965 80039 Transfer out to: 82F Bath Green Park (S&D)    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T m/e 02/1965 41308 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 06/02/1965 80042 Condemned      
Steam 14xx 0-4-2T 2w/e 21/02/1965 1442 Transfer in from: 83E Yeovil Town    
Steam 14xx 0-4-2T 2w/e 21/02/1965 1450 Transfer in from: 83E Yeovil Town    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 2w/e 21/02/1965 75022 Transfer out to: 82E Bristol Barrow Road    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 2w/e 21/02/1965 80035 Transfer out to: 83E Yeovil Town    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 2w/e 07/03/1965 75022 Transfer in from: 82E Bristol Barrow Road    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 2w/e 07/03/1965 80037 Transfer in from: 82F Bath Green Park (S&D)    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 2w/e 07/03/1965 80039 Transfer in from: 82F Bath Green Park (S&D)    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 3w/e 28/03/1965 3759 Transfer out to: 85B Gloucester Horton Road    
Steam 14xx 0-4-2T m/e 05/1965 1450 Condemned      
Steam 2251 0-6-0 m/e 05/1965 2214 Condemned      
Steam 2251 0-6-0 m/e 05/1965 3205 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 5w/e 16/05/1965 75005 Transfer out to: 83E Yeovil Town    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 5w/e 16/05/1965 80039 Transfer out to: 83E Yeovil Town    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT m/e 06/1965 4655 Condemned      
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT m/e 06/1965 4666 Condemned      
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT m/e 06/1965 4694 Condemned      
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT m/e 06/1965 9647 Condemned      
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 13/06/1965 41206 Transfer out to: 83G Templecombe (S&D)    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 13/06/1965 41216 Transfer out to: 83G Templecombe (S&D)    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 13/06/1965 41223 Transfer out to: 83G Templecombe (S&D)    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 13/06/1965 41249 Transfer out to: 83G Templecombe (S&D)    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 13/06/1965 41291 Transfer out to: 83G Templecombe (S&D)    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 13/06/1965 41307 Transfer out to: 83G Templecombe (S&D)    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 4w/e 13/06/1965 75008 Transfer out to: 85A Worcester    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 4w/e 13/06/1965 75022 Transfer out to: 85A Worcester    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 4w/e 13/06/1965 75025 Transfer out to: 85A Worcester    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 4w/e 13/06/1965 80037 Transfer out to: 83G Templecombe (S&D)    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 4w/e 13/06/1965 80041 Transfer out to: 83G Templecombe (S&D)    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 4w/e 13/06/1965 80064 Transfer out to: 82E Bristol Barrow Road    
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 4w/e 13/06/1965 82030 Transfer out to: 85B Gloucester Horton Road    
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 4w/e 13/06/1965 82039 Transfer out to: 85B Gloucester Horton Road    
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 4w/e 13/06/1965 82040 Transfer out to: 85B Gloucester Horton Road    
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 4w/e 13/06/1965 82042 Transfer out to: 85B Gloucester Horton Road    
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 4w/e 13/06/1965 82044 Transfer out to: 85B Gloucester Horton Road    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T m/e 07/1965 41321 Condemned