Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 46 Today
» 1091 Yesterday
» 7500 Week
» 10082 Month
» 274715 Year
» 1496280 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Finsbury Park


Type Class Wheels Period Date Number Event Code Depot Length of Stay Notes
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A on 28/04/1960 D5610 1st Allocation        
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A on 28/04/1960 D5611 1st Allocation        
Diesel 11 0-6-0 w/e 30/04/1960 12112 Transfer in from: 34B Hornsey    
Diesel 11 0-6-0 w/e 30/04/1960 12129 Transfer in from: 34B Hornsey    
Diesel 11 0-6-0 w/e 30/04/1960 12131 Transfer in from: 34B Hornsey    
Diesel 11 0-6-0 w/e 30/04/1960 12137 Transfer in from: 34B Hornsey    
Diesel 11 0-6-0 w/e 30/04/1960 12138 Transfer in from: 34B Hornsey    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 30/04/1960 13331 Transfer in from: 34B Hornsey    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 30/04/1960 13332 Transfer in from: 34B Hornsey    
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 w/e 30/04/1960 D201 Transfer in from: 34B Hornsey    
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 w/e 30/04/1960 D206 Transfer in from: 34B Hornsey    
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 w/e 30/04/1960 D207 Transfer in from: 34B Hornsey    
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 w/e 30/04/1960 D208 Transfer in from: 34B Hornsey    
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 w/e 30/04/1960 D209 Transfer in from: 34B Hornsey    
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 w/e 30/04/1960 D248 Transfer in from: 34B Hornsey    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 30/04/1960 D3691 Transfer in from: 34B Hornsey    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 30/04/1960 D3692 Transfer in from: 34B Hornsey    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 30/04/1960 D3693 Transfer in from: 34B Hornsey    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 30/04/1960 D3704 Transfer in from: 34B Hornsey    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 30/04/1960 D3705 Transfer in from: 34B Hornsey    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 30/04/1960 D3706 Transfer in from: 34B Hornsey    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 30/04/1960 D3710 Transfer in from: 34B Hornsey    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 30/04/1960 D3711 Transfer in from: 34B Hornsey    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 30/04/1960 D3712 Transfer in from: 34B Hornsey    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 30/04/1960 D3713 Transfer in from: 34B Hornsey    
Diesel 26 Bo-Bo w/e 30/04/1960 D5304 Transfer in from: 34B Hornsey    
Diesel 26 Bo-Bo w/e 30/04/1960 D5305 Transfer in from: 34B Hornsey    
Diesel 26 Bo-Bo w/e 30/04/1960 D5306 Transfer in from: 34B Hornsey    
Diesel 26 Bo-Bo w/e 30/04/1960 D5307 Transfer in from: 34B Hornsey    
Diesel 26 Bo-Bo w/e 30/04/1960 D5308 Transfer in from: 34B Hornsey    
Diesel 26 Bo-Bo w/e 30/04/1960 D5309 Transfer in from: 34B Hornsey    
Diesel 26 Bo-Bo w/e 30/04/1960 D5310 Transfer in from: 34B Hornsey    
Diesel 26 Bo-Bo w/e 30/04/1960 D5311 Transfer in from: 34B Hornsey    
Diesel 26 Bo-Bo w/e 30/04/1960 D5312 Transfer in from: 34B Hornsey    
Diesel 26 Bo-Bo w/e 30/04/1960 D5313 Transfer in from: 34B Hornsey    
Diesel 26 Bo-Bo w/e 30/04/1960 D5314 Transfer in from: 34B Hornsey    
Diesel 26 Bo-Bo w/e 30/04/1960 D5315 Transfer in from: 34B Hornsey    
Diesel 26 Bo-Bo w/e 30/04/1960 D5316 Transfer in from: 34B Hornsey    
Diesel 26 Bo-Bo w/e 30/04/1960 D5317 Transfer in from: 34B Hornsey    
Diesel 26 Bo-Bo w/e 30/04/1960 D5318 Transfer in from: 34B Hornsey    
Diesel 26 Bo-Bo w/e 30/04/1960 D5319 Transfer in from: 34B Hornsey    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 30/04/1960 D5586 Transfer in from: 34B Hornsey    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 30/04/1960 D5587 Transfer in from: 34B Hornsey    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 30/04/1960 D5588 Transfer in from: 34B Hornsey    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 30/04/1960 D5589 Transfer in from: 34B Hornsey    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 30/04/1960 D5590 Transfer in from: 34B Hornsey    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 30/04/1960 D5591 Transfer in from: 34B Hornsey    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 30/04/1960 D5592 Transfer in from: 34B Hornsey    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 30/04/1960 D5593 Transfer in from: 34B Hornsey    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 30/04/1960 D5594 Transfer in from: 34B Hornsey    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 30/04/1960 D5595 Transfer in from: 34B Hornsey    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 30/04/1960 D5596 Transfer in from: 34B Hornsey    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 30/04/1960 D5597 Transfer in from: 34B Hornsey    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 30/04/1960 D5598 Transfer in from: 34B Hornsey    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 30/04/1960 D5599 Transfer in from: 34B Hornsey    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 30/04/1960 D5600 Transfer in from: 34B Hornsey    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 30/04/1960 D5601 Transfer in from: 34B Hornsey    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 30/04/1960 D5602 Transfer in from: 34B Hornsey    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 30/04/1960 D5603 Transfer in from: 34B Hornsey    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 30/04/1960 D5604 Transfer in from: 34B Hornsey    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 30/04/1960 D5605 Transfer in from: 34B Hornsey    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 30/04/1960 D5606 Transfer in from: 34B Hornsey    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 30/04/1960 D5607 Transfer in from: 34B Hornsey    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 30/04/1960 D5608 Transfer in from: 34B Hornsey    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 30/04/1960 D5609 Transfer in from: 34B Hornsey    
Diesel 23 Bo-Bo w/e 30/04/1960 D5900 Transfer in from: 34B Hornsey    
Diesel 23 Bo-Bo w/e 30/04/1960 D5901 Transfer in from: 34B Hornsey    
Diesel 23 Bo-Bo w/e 30/04/1960 D5902 Transfer in from: 34B Hornsey    
Diesel 23 Bo-Bo w/e 30/04/1960 D5903 Transfer in from: 34B Hornsey    
Diesel 23 Bo-Bo w/e 30/04/1960 D5904 Transfer in from: 34B Hornsey    
Diesel 23 Bo-Bo w/e 30/04/1960 D5905 Transfer in from: 34B Hornsey    
Diesel 23 Bo-Bo w/e 30/04/1960 D5906 Transfer in from: 34B Hornsey    
Diesel 23 Bo-Bo w/e 30/04/1960 D5907 Transfer in from: 34B Hornsey    
Diesel 23 Bo-Bo w/e 30/04/1960 D5908 Transfer in from: 34B Hornsey    
Diesel 23 Bo-Bo w/e 30/04/1960 D5909 Transfer in from: 34B Hornsey    
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo w/e 30/04/1960 D8020 Transfer in from: 34B Hornsey    
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo w/e 30/04/1960 D8021 Transfer in from: 34B Hornsey    
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo w/e 30/04/1960 D8022 Transfer in from: 34B Hornsey    
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo w/e 30/04/1960 D8023 Transfer in from: 34B Hornsey    
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo w/e 30/04/1960 D8024 Transfer in from: 34B Hornsey    
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo w/e 30/04/1960 D8025 Transfer in from: 34B Hornsey    
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo w/e 30/04/1960 D8026 Transfer in from: 34B Hornsey    
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo w/e 30/04/1960 D8027 Transfer in from: 34B Hornsey    
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo w/e 30/04/1960 D8045 Transfer in from: 34B Hornsey    
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo w/e 30/04/1960 D8046 Transfer in from: 34B Hornsey    
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo w/e 30/04/1960 D8047 Transfer in from: 34B Hornsey    
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo w/e 30/04/1960 D8048 Transfer in from: 34B Hornsey    
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo w/e 30/04/1960 D8049 Transfer in from: 34B Hornsey    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A on 05/05/1960 D5612 1st Allocation        
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A on 05/05/1960 D5613 1st Allocation        
Diesel 26 Bo-Bo w/e 07/05/1960 D5304 Transfer out to: 64B Haymarket    
Diesel 26 Bo-Bo w/e 07/05/1960 D5305 Transfer out to: 64B Haymarket    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A on 12/05/1960 D5614 1st Allocation        
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A on 12/05/1960 D5615 1st Allocation        
Diesel 26 Bo-Bo w/e 14/05/1960 D5307 Transfer out to: 64B Haymarket    
Diesel 26 Bo-Bo w/e 14/05/1960 D5308 Transfer out to: 64B Haymarket    
Diesel 26 Bo-Bo w/e 21/05/1960 D5309 Transfer out to: 64B Haymarket    
Diesel 26 Bo-Bo w/e 28/05/1960 D5306 Transfer out to: 64B Haymarket    
Diesel 26 Bo-Bo w/e 28/05/1960 D5310 Transfer out to: 64B Haymarket    
Diesel 26 Bo-Bo w/e 04/06/1960 D5312 Transfer out to: 64B Haymarket    
Diesel 26 Bo-Bo w/e 04/06/1960 D5313 Transfer out to: 64B Haymarket    
Diesel 26 Bo-Bo w/e 25/06/1960 D5314 Transfer out to: 64B Haymarket    
Diesel 26 Bo-Bo w/e 25/06/1960 D5315 Transfer out to: 64B Haymarket    
Diesel 26 Bo-Bo w/e 02/07/1960 D5316 Transfer out to: 64B Haymarket    
Diesel 26 Bo-Bo w/e 02/07/1960 D5317 Transfer out to: 64B Haymarket    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A on 11/08/1960 D5639 1st Allocation        
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A on 18/08/1960 D5640 1st Allocation        
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A on 18/08/1960 D5641 1st Allocation        
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A on 18/08/1960 D5642 1st Allocation        
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A on 25/08/1960 D5643 1st Allocation        
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A on 25/08/1960 D5644 1st Allocation        
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A on 01/09/1960 D5645 1st Allocation        
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A on 01/09/1960 D5646 1st Allocation        
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A on 01/09/1960 D5647 1st Allocation        
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A on 08/09/1960 D5648 1st Allocation        
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A on 08/09/1960 D5649 1st Allocation        
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A on 15/09/1960 D5650 1st Allocation        
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A on 15/09/1960 D5651 1st Allocation        
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A on 22/09/1960 D5652 1st Allocation        
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A on 22/09/1960 D5653 1st Allocation        
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A on 29/09/1960 D5654 1st Allocation        
Diesel 26 Bo-Bo w/e 01/10/1960 D5318 Transfer out to: 64B Haymarket    
Diesel 26 Bo-Bo w/e 01/10/1960 D5319 Transfer out to: 64B Haymarket    
Diesel 26 Bo-Bo 4w/e 22/10/1960 D5311 Transfer out to: 64B Haymarket    
Diesel 15 Bo-Bo on 17/11/1960 D8237 1st Allocation        
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 19/11/1960 D5587 Transfer out to: 41A Sheffield Darnall    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A on 24/11/1960 D5672 1st Allocation        
Diesel 15 Bo-Bo w/e 26/11/1960 D8210 Transfer in from: 30A Stratford    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A on 01/12/1960 D5673 1st Allocation        
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A on 01/12/1960 D5674 1st Allocation        
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo w/e 03/12/1960 D8020 Transfer out to: 41A Sheffield Darnall    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A on 08/12/1960 D5675 1st Allocation        
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A on 08/12/1960 D5676 1st Allocation        
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A on 15/12/1960 D5677 1st Allocation        
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A on 15/12/1960 D5678 1st Allocation        
Diesel 15 Bo-Bo on 21/12/1960 D8238 1st Allocation        
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A on 22/12/1960 D5679 1st Allocation        
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo w/e 07/01/1961 D5069 Transfer in from: 30A Stratford    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 07/01/1961 D3691 Transfer out to: 34D Hitchin (GNR)    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 07/01/1961 D5592 Transfer out to: 30A Stratford    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 07/01/1961 D5605 Transfer out to: 30A Stratford    
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo w/e 07/01/1961 D5070 Transfer in from: 30A Stratford    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 14/01/1961 D3307 Transfer in from: 34A Kings Cross    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 14/01/1961 D3308 Transfer in from: 34A Kings Cross    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 14/01/1961 D3309 Transfer in from: 34A Kings Cross    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 14/01/1961 D3310 Transfer in from: 34A Kings Cross    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 14/01/1961 D3311 Transfer in from: 34A Kings Cross    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 14/01/1961 D3312 Transfer in from: 34A Kings Cross    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 14/01/1961 D3687 Transfer in from: 34A Kings Cross    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 14/01/1961 D3714 Transfer in from: 34A Kings Cross    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 14/01/1961 D3715 Transfer in from: 34A Kings Cross    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 14/01/1961 D3716 Transfer in from: 34A Kings Cross    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 14/01/1961 D3717 Transfer in from: 34A Kings Cross    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 14/01/1961 D3718 Transfer in from: 34A Kings Cross    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 14/01/1961 D3722 Transfer in from: 34A Kings Cross    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 14/01/1961 D3723 Transfer in from: 34A Kings Cross    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 14/01/1961 D3724 Transfer in from: 34A Kings Cross    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 14/01/1961 D3725 Transfer in from: 34A Kings Cross    
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo w/e 14/01/1961 D5051 Transfer in from: 31B March    
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo w/e 14/01/1961 D5052 Transfer in from: 31B March    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 14/01/1961 D5600 Transfer out to: 31B March    
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo w/e 21/01/1961 D5055 Transfer in from: 31B March    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 21/01/1961 D5589 Transfer out to: 31B March    
Diesel 15 Bo-Bo on 23/01/1961 D8239 1st Allocation        
Diesel 15 Bo-Bo on 23/01/1961 D8240 1st Allocation        
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo w/e 28/01/1961 D5054 Transfer in from: 31B March    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 28/01/1961 D5671 Transfer in from: 41A Sheffield Darnall    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 28/01/1961 D5586 Transfer out to: 31B March    
Diesel 15 Bo-Bo on 01/02/1961 D8241 1st Allocation        
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 04/02/1961 D5588 Transfer out to: 31B March    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 04/02/1961 D5591 Transfer out to: 31B March    
Diesel 15 Bo-Bo on 10/02/1961 D8242 1st Allocation        
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo w/e 11/02/1961 D5057 Transfer in from: 31B March    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 11/02/1961 D5590 Transfer out to: 31B March    
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo w/e 18/02/1961 D5056 Transfer in from: 31B March    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo w/e 18/02/1961 D6504 Transfer in from: 73C Hither Green    
Diesel 55 Co-Co on 23/02/1961 D9001 1st Allocation        
Diesel 15 Bo-Bo on 24/02/1961 D8243 1st Allocation        
Diesel 11 0-6-0 w/e 25/02/1961 12129 Transfer out to: 30A Stratford    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo w/e 25/02/1961 D6504 Transfer out to: 73C Hither Green    
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo w/e 04/03/1961 D5058 Transfer in from: 31B March    
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo w/e 11/03/1961 D5064 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo w/e 18/03/1961 D5050 Transfer in from: 30A Stratford    
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo w/e 18/03/1961 D5059 Transfer in from: 1B Camden    
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo w/e 18/03/1961 D5060 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo w/e 18/03/1961 D5066 Transfer in from: 31B March    
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo w/e 18/03/1961 D5067 Transfer in from: 30A Stratford    
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo w/e 18/03/1961 D5071 Transfer in from: 30A Stratford    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 18/03/1961 D5593 Transfer out to: 30A Stratford    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 18/03/1961 D5594 Transfer out to: 30A Stratford    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 18/03/1961 D5595 Transfer out to: 30A Stratford    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 18/03/1961 D5596 Transfer out to: 30A Stratford    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 18/03/1961 D5597 Transfer out to: 30A Stratford    
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo w/e 25/03/1961 D5053 Transfer in from: 31B March    
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo w/e 25/03/1961 D5062 Transfer in from: 30F Parkeston Quay    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 25/03/1961 D5598 Transfer out to: 30A Stratford    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 25/03/1961 D5599 Transfer out to: 30A Stratford    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 25/03/1961 D5601 Transfer out to: 31B March    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 25/03/1961 D5602 Transfer out to: 30A Stratford    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 25/03/1961 D5603 Transfer out to: 30A Stratford    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 25/03/1961 D5604 Transfer out to: 30A Stratford    
Diesel 55 Co-Co on 27/03/1961 D9003 1st Allocation        
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo w/e 01/04/1961 D5059 Transfer in from: 34G Finsbury Park    
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo w/e 01/04/1961 D5060 Transfer in from: 34G Finsbury Park    
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo w/e 01/04/1961 D5063 Transfer in from: 1C Watford    
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo w/e 01/04/1961 D5066 Transfer in from: 34G Finsbury Park    
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo w/e 01/04/1961 D5094 Transfer in from: 30A Stratford    
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo w/e 01/04/1961 D5059 Transfer out to: 34G Finsbury Park    
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo w/e 01/04/1961 D5060 Transfer out to: 34G Finsbury Park    
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo w/e 01/04/1961 D5066 Transfer out to: 34G Finsbury Park    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 01/04/1961 D5608 Transfer out to: 30A Stratford    
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo w/e 29/04/1961 D5065 Transfer in from: 31B March    
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo w/e 29/04/1961 D5068 Transfer in from: 31B March    
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo w/e 06/05/1961 D5072 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Diesel 11 0-6-0 w/e 20/05/1961 12129 Transfer in from: 30A Stratford    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 20/05/1961 D5602 Transfer in from: 30A Stratford    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 27/05/1961 D5603 Transfer in from: 30A Stratford    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 03/06/1961 D5604 Transfer in from: 30A Stratford    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 03/06/1961 D5605 Transfer in from: 30A Stratford    
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo w/e 17/06/1961 D5095 Transfer in from: 31B March    
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 w/e 17/06/1961 D201 Transfer out to: 30A Stratford    
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 w/e 17/06/1961 D206 Transfer out to: 30A Stratford    
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 w/e 17/06/1961 D207 Transfer out to: 30A Stratford    
Diesel 55 Co-Co on 22/06/1961 D9007 1st Allocation        
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 24/06/1961 D5608 Transfer in from: 30A Stratford    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 01/07/1961 D5601 Transfer in from: 31B March    
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 w/e 08/07/1961 D248 Transfer out to: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo w/e 15/07/1961 D5061 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Diesel 55 Co-Co on 21/07/1961 D9009 1st Allocation        
Diesel 55 Co-Co on 04/09/1961 D9012 1st Allocation        
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 w/e 07/10/1961 D208 Transfer out to: 30A Stratford    
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 w/e 07/10/1961 D209 Transfer out to: 30A Stratford    
Diesel 55 Co-Co on 13/10/1961 D9015 1st Allocation        
Diesel 10 0-6-0 on 13/11/1961 D4078 1st Allocation        
Diesel 55 Co-Co on 24/11/1961 D9018 1st Allocation        
Diesel 10 0-6-0 on 26/01/1962 D4083 1st Allocation        
Diesel 10 0-6-0 on 03/02/1962 D4084 1st Allocation        
Diesel 10 0-6-0 on 08/02/1962 D4085 1st Allocation        
Diesel 55 Co-Co on 12/02/1962 D9020 1st Allocation        
Diesel 46 1Co-Co1 w/e 24/02/1962 D154 Transfer in from: 17A Derby    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 03/03/1962 D3687 Transfer out to: 34D Hitchin (GNR)    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 12/05/1962 D5680 Transfer in from: 41A Sheffield Darnall    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 12/05/1962 D5681 Transfer in from: 41A Sheffield Darnall    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 12/05/1962 D5682 Transfer in from: 41A Sheffield Darnall    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 12/05/1962 D5683 Transfer in from: 41A Sheffield Darnall    
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo w/e 12/05/1962 D8021 Transfer out to: 41A Sheffield Darnall    
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo w/e 12/05/1962 D8023 Transfer out to: 41A Sheffield Darnall    
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo w/e 12/05/1962 D8024 Transfer out to: 41A Sheffield Darnall    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 19/05/1962 D5835 Transfer in from: 41A Sheffield Darnall    
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo w/e 26/05/1962 D8022 Transfer out to: 41A Sheffield Darnall    
Diesel 46 1Co-Co1 w/e 23/06/1962 D154 Transfer out to: 17A Derby    
Diesel 15 Bo-Bo w/e 23/06/1962 D8210 Transfer out to: 30A Stratford    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 14/07/1962 D5835 Transfer out to: 41A Sheffield Darnall    
Diesel 46 1Co-Co1 w/e 21/07/1962 D155 Transfer in from: 9E Trafford Park (LMS)    
Diesel 46 1Co-Co1 w/e 11/08/1962 D155 Transfer out to: 17A Derby    
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo w/e 15/09/1962 D8020 Transfer in from: 41A Sheffield Darnall    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 15/09/1962 D5682 Transfer out to: 31B March    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 15/09/1962 D5683 Transfer out to: 31B March    
Diesel 47 Co-Co on 28/09/1962 D1500 1st Allocation        
Diesel 10 0-6-0 w/e 29/09/1962 D4078 Transfer out to: 36A Doncaster    
Diesel 47 Co-Co 4w/e 03/11/1962 D1500 Transfer in from: 34G Finsbury Park    
Diesel 47 Co-Co 4w/e 03/11/1962 D1500 Transfer out to: 34G Finsbury Park    
Diesel 47 Co-Co on 13/11/1962 D1501 1st Allocation        
Diesel 47 Co-Co on 30/11/1962 D1502 1st Allocation        
Diesel 10 0-6-0 w/e 01/12/1962 D4083 Transfer out to: 34E New England    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 08/12/1962 D1500 Transfer in from: 34G Finsbury Park    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 08/12/1962 D1500 Transfer out to: 34G Finsbury Park    
Diesel 47 Co-Co on 31/12/1962 D1503 1st Allocation        
Diesel 47 Co-Co m/e 01/1963 D1500 Transfer in from: 34G Finsbury Park    
Diesel 47 Co-Co m/e 01/1963 D1500 Transfer out to: 34G Finsbury Park    
Diesel 47 Co-Co on 03/01/1963 D1504 1st Allocation        
Diesel 47 Co-Co on 11/01/1963 D1505 1st Allocation        
Diesel 10 0-6-0 w/e 12/01/1963 D4084 Transfer out to: 34E New England    
Diesel 47 Co-Co on 18/01/1963 D1506 1st Allocation        
Diesel 47 Co-Co on 18/01/1963 D1507 1st Allocation        
Diesel 47 Co-Co on 23/01/1963 D1508 1st Allocation        
Diesel 47 Co-Co on 04/02/1963 D1509 1st Allocation        
Diesel 47 Co-Co on 26/02/1963 D1510 1st Allocation        
Diesel 47 Co-Co on 28/02/1963 D1511 1st Allocation        
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 02/03/1963 D1500 Transfer in from: 34G Finsbury Park    
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo w/e 02/03/1963 D8021 Transfer in from: 41A Sheffield Darnall    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 02/03/1963 D1500 Transfer out to: 34G Finsbury Park    
Diesel 10 0-6-0 w/e 02/03/1963 D4085 Transfer out to: 41J Langwith Junction    
Diesel 47 Co-Co on 08/03/1963 D1512 1st Allocation        
Diesel 47 Co-Co on 15/03/1963 D1513 1st Allocation        
Diesel 47 Co-Co on 22/03/1963 D1514 1st Allocation        
Diesel 47 Co-Co on 29/03/1963 D1515 1st Allocation        
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 06/04/1963 D1510 Transfer out to: 64B Haymarket    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 06/04/1963 D1510 Transfer in from: 64B Haymarket    
Diesel 47 Co-Co on 10/04/1963 D1516 1st Allocation        
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 13/04/1963 D1515 Transfer out to: 55H Neville Hill    
Diesel 47 Co-Co on 19/04/1963 D1517 1st Allocation        
Diesel 47 Co-Co on 26/04/1963 D1519 1st Allocation        
Diesel 15 Bo-Bo w/e 27/04/1963 D8230 Transfer in from: 30A Stratford    
Diesel 15 Bo-Bo w/e 27/04/1963 D8231 Transfer in from: 30A Stratford    
Diesel 15 Bo-Bo w/e 27/04/1963 D8232 Transfer in from: 30A Stratford    
Diesel 15 Bo-Bo w/e 27/04/1963 D8233 Transfer in from: 30A Stratford    
Diesel 15 Bo-Bo w/e 27/04/1963 D8235 Transfer in from: 30A Stratford    
Diesel 15 Bo-Bo w/e 27/04/1963 D8236 Transfer in from: 30A Stratford    
Diesel 15 Bo-Bo w/e 27/04/1963 D8237 Transfer out to: 30A Stratford    
Diesel 15 Bo-Bo w/e 27/04/1963 D8238 Transfer out to: 30A Stratford    
Diesel 15 Bo-Bo w/e 27/04/1963 D8239 Transfer out to: 30A Stratford    
Diesel 15 Bo-Bo w/e 27/04/1963 D8241 Transfer out to: 30A Stratford    
Diesel 15 Bo-Bo w/e 27/04/1963 D8242 Transfer out to: 30A Stratford    
Diesel 15 Bo-Bo w/e 27/04/1963 D8243 Transfer out to: 30A Stratford    
Diesel 15 Bo-Bo w/e 04/05/1963 D8229 Transfer in from: 32B Ipswich    
Diesel 15 Bo-Bo w/e 04/05/1963 D8240 Transfer out to: 32B Ipswich    
Diesel 47 Co-Co on 10/05/1963 D1518 1st Allocation        
Diesel 11 0-6-0 w/e 11/05/1963 12137 Transfer out to: 40B Immingham    
Diesel 47 Co-Co on 05/06/1963 D1520 1st Allocation        
Diesel 47 Co-Co on 07/06/1963 D1521 1st Allocation        
Diesel 47 Co-Co on 12/06/1963 D1523 1st Allocation        
Diesel 47 Co-Co on 14/06/1963 D1522 1st Allocation        
Diesel 47 Co-Co on 14/06/1963 D1524 1st Allocation        
Diesel 47 Co-Co on 14/06/1963 D1525 1st Allocation        
Diesel 47 Co-Co on 21/06/1963 D1526 1st Allocation        
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 22/06/1963 D1515 Transfer in from: 55H Neville Hill    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 22/06/1963 D5583 Transfer in from: 41A Sheffield Darnall    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 22/06/1963 D5585 Transfer in from: 41A Sheffield Darnall    
Diesel 47 Co-Co on 03/07/1963 D1527 1st Allocation        
Diesel 47 Co-Co on 05/07/1963 D1528 1st Allocation        
Diesel 47 Co-Co on 05/07/1963 D1529 1st Allocation        
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 06/07/1963 D3307 Transfer out to: 41A Sheffield Darnall    
Diesel 47 Co-Co on 15/07/1963 D1530 1st Allocation        
Diesel 47 Co-Co on 15/07/1963 D1531 1st Allocation        
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 20/07/1963 D5583 Transfer out to: 41A Sheffield Darnall    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 20/07/1963 D5585 Transfer out to: 41A Sheffield Darnall    
Diesel 47 Co-Co on 26/07/1963 D1532 1st Allocation        
Diesel 47 Co-Co 4w/e 03/08/1963 D1527 Transfer out to: 64B Haymarket    
Diesel 47 Co-Co on 06/08/1963 D1533 1st Allocation        
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 24/08/1963 D1532 Transfer out to: 41A Sheffield Darnall    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 24/08/1963 D1533 Transfer out to: 41A Sheffield Darnall    
Diesel LION Co-Co on 09/09/1963 D0260 Transfer in from: 84A Stafford Road    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 14/09/1963 D1527 Transfer in from: 64B Haymarket    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 14/09/1963 D5853 Transfer in from: 40A Lincoln    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 14/09/1963 D5854 Transfer in from: 40A Lincoln    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 14/09/1963 D1530 Transfer out to: 41A Sheffield Darnall    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 14/09/1963 D1531 Transfer out to: 41A Sheffield Darnall    
Diesel 47 Co-Co on 24/10/1963 D1547 1st Allocation        
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 02/11/1963 D1530 Transfer in from: 41A Sheffield Darnall    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 02/11/1963 D1546 Transfer in from: 41A Sheffield Darnall    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 02/11/1963 D1500 Transfer out to: 41A Sheffield Darnall    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 02/11/1963 D1501 Transfer out to: 41A Sheffield Darnall    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 w/e 23/11/1963 D2019 Transfer in from: 34D Hitchin (GNR)    
Diesel LION Co-Co on 20/01/1964 D0260 Condemned      
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 02/05/1964 D1501 Transfer in from: 41A Sheffield Darnall    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 23/05/1964 D1566 Transfer in from: 40B Immingham    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 23/05/1964 D1569 Transfer in from: 40B Immingham    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 30/05/1964 D3307 Transfer in from: 41B Sheffield Darnall    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 w/e 30/05/1964 D2019 Transfer out to: 34D Hitchin (GNR)    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 20/06/1964 D1568 Transfer in from: 40B Immingham    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 24/10/1964 D1533 Transfer in from: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 24/10/1964 D1549 Transfer in from: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 24/10/1964 D1559 Transfer in from: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 24/10/1964 D1561 Transfer in from: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 24/10/1964 D1562 Transfer in from: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 24/10/1964 D1563 Transfer in from: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 24/10/1964 D1758 Transfer in from: 40B Immingham    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 14/11/1964 D1759 Transfer in from: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 21/11/1964 D1761 Transfer in from: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 21/11/1964 D1758 Transfer out to: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 28/11/1964 D5599 Transfer in from: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 28/11/1964 D5677 Transfer out to: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 55 Co-Co w/e 12/12/1964 D9021 Transfer in from: 64B Haymarket    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 09/01/1965 D1500 Transfer in from: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 09/01/1965 D1531 Transfer in from: 32A Norwich Thorpe    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 09/01/1965 D1532 Transfer in from: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 09/01/1965 D1534 Transfer in from: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 09/01/1965 D1535 Transfer in from: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 09/01/1965 D1536 Transfer in from: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 09/01/1965 D1537 Transfer in from: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 09/01/1965 D1538 Transfer in from: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 09/01/1965 D1539 Transfer in from: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 09/01/1965 D1540 Transfer in from: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 09/01/1965 D1541 Transfer in from: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 09/01/1965 D1542 Transfer in from: 32B Ipswich    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 09/01/1965 D1543 Transfer in from: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 09/01/1965 D1544 Transfer in from: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 09/01/1965 D1545 Transfer in from: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 09/01/1965 D5586 Transfer in from: 31B March    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 09/01/1965 D5587 Transfer in from: 30A Stratford    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 09/01/1965 D5588 Transfer in from: 30A Stratford    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 09/01/1965 D5589 Transfer in from: 30A Stratford    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 09/01/1965 D5590 Transfer in from: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 09/01/1965 D5592 Transfer in from: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 09/01/1965 D5595 Transfer in from: 31B March    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 09/01/1965 D5596 Transfer in from: 31B March    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 09/01/1965 D5597 Transfer in from: 31B March    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 09/01/1965 D5622 Transfer in from: 31B March    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 09/01/1965 D5623 Transfer in from: 31B March    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 09/01/1965 D5624 Transfer in from: 31B March    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 09/01/1965 D5625 Transfer in from: 31B March    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 09/01/1965 D5626 Transfer in from: 31B March    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 09/01/1965 D5627 Transfer in from: 31B March    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 09/01/1965 D1549 Transfer out to: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 09/01/1965 D1559 Transfer out to: 31B March    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 09/01/1965 D1561 Transfer out to: 31B March    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 09/01/1965 D1562 Transfer out to: 31B March    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 09/01/1965 D1563 Transfer out to: 31B March    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 09/01/1965 D1566 Transfer out to: 31B March    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 09/01/1965 D1568 Transfer out to: 40B Immingham    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 09/01/1965 D1569 Transfer out to: 40B Immingham    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 09/01/1965 D1759 Transfer out to: 31B March    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 09/01/1965 D1761 Transfer out to: 31B March    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 09/01/1965 D5679 Transfer out to: 40B Immingham    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 09/01/1965 D5680 Transfer out to: 40B Immingham    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 09/01/1965 D5681 Transfer out to: 40B Immingham    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 09/01/1965 D5853 Transfer out to: 40B Immingham    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 09/01/1965 D5854 Transfer out to: 40B Immingham    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 20/02/1965 D5612 Transfer out to: D15 Leicester Division    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 20/03/1965 D5593 Transfer in from: 30A Stratford    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 20/03/1965 D5645 Transfer out to: 30A Stratford    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 27/03/1965 D5612 Transfer in from: D15 Leicester Division    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 03/04/1965 D5552 Transfer in from: 32B Ipswich    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 03/04/1965 D5685 Transfer in from: 32A Norwich Thorpe    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 03/04/1965 D5698 Transfer in from: 30A Stratford    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 17/04/1965 D5660 Transfer in from: 31B March    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 17/04/1965 D5662 Transfer in from: 32A Norwich Thorpe    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 17/04/1965 D5663 Transfer in from: 32A Norwich Thorpe    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 17/04/1965 D5664 Transfer in from: 30A Stratford    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 17/04/1965 D5860 Transfer in from: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 46 1Co-Co1 w/e 01/05/1965 D174 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 01/05/1965 D1547 Transfer out to: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 22/05/1965 D1547 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo w/e 22/05/1965 D7526 Transfer in from: 31B March    
Diesel 47 Co-Co 4w/e 22/05/1965 D1543 Transfer out to: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo w/e 12/06/1965 D7526 Transfer out to: D16 Nottingham Division    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 19/06/1965 D1543 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 46 1Co-Co1 w/e 19/06/1965 D174 Transfer out to: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 19/06/1965 D5552 Transfer out to: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 19/06/1965 D5592 Transfer out to: 40B Immingham    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 19/06/1965 D5593 Transfer out to: 40B Immingham    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 19/06/1965 D5595 Transfer out to: 40B Immingham    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 19/06/1965 D5596 Transfer out to: 40B Immingham    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 19/06/1965 D5597 Transfer out to: 40B Immingham    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 19/06/1965 D5599 Transfer out to: 40B Immingham    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 19/06/1965 D5660 Transfer out to: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 19/06/1965 D5662 Transfer out to: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 19/06/1965 D5663 Transfer out to: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 19/06/1965 D5664 Transfer out to: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 19/06/1965 D5678 Transfer out to: 40B Immingham    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 19/06/1965 D5685 Transfer out to: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 19/06/1965 D5698 Transfer out to: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 19/06/1965 D5860 Transfer out to: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 55 Co-Co w/e 19/06/1965 D9021 Transfer out to: 64B Haymarket    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 10/07/1965 D1550 Transfer in from: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 10/07/1965 D1551 Transfer in from: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 10/07/1965 D1576 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 10/07/1965 D5665 Transfer in from: 30A Stratford    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 10/07/1965 D5670 Transfer in from: 30A Stratford    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 17/07/1965 D5595 Transfer in from: 40B Immingham    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 17/07/1965 D5596 Transfer in from: 40B Immingham    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 17/07/1965 D5678 Transfer in from: 40B Immingham    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 24/07/1965 D5598 Transfer in from: 30A Stratford    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 24/07/1965 D1576 Transfer out to: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 24/07/1965 D5587 Transfer out to: 30A Stratford    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 31/07/1965 D1529 Transfer out to: 92D Research Department (Derby)    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 28/08/1965 D1529 Transfer in from: 92D Research Department (Derby)    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 09/10/1965 D1525 Transfer out to: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 09/10/1965 D1527 Transfer out to: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 09/10/1965 D1531 Transfer out to: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 09/10/1965 D5586 Transfer out to: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 09/10/1965 D5665 Transfer out to: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 09/10/1965 D5670 Transfer out to: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 06/11/1965 D3326 Transfer in from: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 06/11/1965 D3661 Transfer in from: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 06/11/1965 D1551 Transfer out to: 40B Immingham    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 06/11/1965 D5588 Transfer out to: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 06/11/1965 D5589 Transfer out to: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 06/11/1965 D5590 Transfer out to: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 11/12/1965 D3326 Transfer out to: 34D Hitchin (GNR)    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 11/12/1965 D3661 Transfer out to: 34D Hitchin (GNR)    
Diesel 11 0-6-0 w/e 08/01/1966 12112 Transfer out to: D14 London (Midland)    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 29/01/1966 D1776 Transfer in from: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 29/01/1966 D1518 Transfer out to: 5A Crewe Diesel    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 29/01/1966 D1519 Transfer out to: 5A Crewe Diesel    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 05/02/1966 D1525 Transfer in from: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 05/02/1966 D1527 Transfer in from: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 05/03/1966 D1868 Transfer in from: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 05/03/1966 D1550 Transfer out to: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 16/04/1966 D1518 Transfer in from: 5A Crewe Diesel    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 16/04/1966 D1519 Transfer in from: 5A Crewe Diesel    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 16/04/1966 D1531 Transfer in from: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 16/04/1966 D1545 Transfer out to: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 16/04/1966 D1547 Transfer out to: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 16/04/1966 D1868 Transfer out to: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 23/04/1966 D1546 Transfer out to: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 23/04/1966 D1776 Transfer out to: 30A Stratford    
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo w/e 23/04/1966 D8020 Transfer out to: 40B Immingham    
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo w/e 23/04/1966 D8021 Transfer out to: 40B Immingham    
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo w/e 23/04/1966 D8025 Transfer out to: 40B Immingham    
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo w/e 23/04/1966 D8026 Transfer out to: 40B Immingham    
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo w/e 23/04/1966 D8027 Transfer out to: 40B Immingham    
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo w/e 23/04/1966 D8045 Transfer out to: 40B Immingham    
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo w/e 23/04/1966 D8046 Transfer out to: 40B Immingham    
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo w/e 23/04/1966 D8047 Transfer out to: 40B Immingham    
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo w/e 23/04/1966 D8048 Transfer out to: 40B Immingham    
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo w/e 23/04/1966 D8049 Transfer out to: 40B Immingham    
Diesel 15 Bo-Bo w/e 23/04/1966 D8229 Transfer out to: 30A Stratford    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 07/05/1966 D1575 Transfer in from: 31B March    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 07/05/1966 D5671 Transfer out to: 40B Immingham    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 21/05/1966 D1874 Transfer in from: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 21/05/1966 D1544 Transfer out to: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 11/06/1966 D1545 Transfer in from: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 11/06/1966 D5671 Transfer in from: 40B Immingham    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 11/06/1966 D1575 Transfer out to: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 18/06/1966 D1543 Transfer out to: 31B March    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 18/06/1966 D1545 Transfer out to: 31B March    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 16/07/1966 D1540 Transfer out to: 30A Stratford    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 06/08/1966 D5586 Transfer in from: 40B Immingham    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A w/e 06/08/1966 D5587 Transfer in from: 30A Stratford    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 06/08/1966 D5589 Transfer in from: 40B Immingham    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A w/e 06/08/1966 D5591 Transfer in from: 30A Stratford    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 06/08/1966 D5592 Transfer in from: 40B Immingham    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 06/08/1966 D5593 Transfer in from: 40B Immingham    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A w/e 06/08/1966 D5594 Transfer in from: 30A Stratford    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 06/08/1966 D5597 Transfer in from: 40B Immingham    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 06/08/1966 D5600 Transfer in from: 40B Immingham    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A w/e 06/08/1966 D5645 Transfer in from: 30A Stratford    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 06/08/1966 D5679 Transfer in from: 31B March    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 06/08/1966 D1535 Transfer out to: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 06/08/1966 D1536 Transfer out to: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 06/08/1966 D1537 Transfer out to: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 06/08/1966 D1538 Transfer out to: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 06/08/1966 D1539 Transfer out to: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 06/08/1966 D1541 Transfer out to: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 06/08/1966 D1542 Transfer out to: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo w/e 06/08/1966 D5057 Transfer out to: D01 London Division    
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo w/e 06/08/1966 D5058 Transfer out to: D01 London Division    
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo w/e 06/08/1966 D5059 Transfer out to: D01 London Division    
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo w/e 06/08/1966 D5060 Transfer out to: D01 London Division    
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo w/e 13/08/1966 D5061 Transfer out to: 64B Haymarket    
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo w/e 13/08/1966 D5062 Transfer out to: 64B Haymarket    
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo w/e 13/08/1966 D5064 Transfer out to: 64B Haymarket    
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo w/e 13/08/1966 D5065 Transfer out to: 64B Haymarket    
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo w/e 13/08/1966 D5068 Transfer out to: 64B Haymarket    
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo w/e 13/08/1966 D5069 Transfer out to: 64B Haymarket    
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo w/e 13/08/1966 D5071 Transfer out to: 64B Haymarket    
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo w/e 13/08/1966 D5072 Transfer out to: 64B Haymarket    
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo w/e 13/08/1966 D5095 Transfer out to: 64B Haymarket    
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo w/e 20/08/1966 D7600 Transfer in from: 41E Staveley (Barrow Hill)    
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo 4w/e 20/08/1966 D5066 Transfer out to: 64B Haymarket    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 20/08/1966 D5679 Transfer out to: 41C Wath    
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo m/e 09/1966 D5067 Transfer in from: 34G Finsbury Park    
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo m/e 09/1966 D5067 Transfer out to: 34G Finsbury Park    
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo w/e 03/09/1966 D5094 Transfer out to: 64B Haymarket    
Diesel 11 0-6-0 w/e 10/09/1966 12129 Transfer out to: 30A Stratford    
Diesel 11 0-6-0 w/e 10/09/1966 12131 Transfer out to: 30A Stratford    
Diesel 11 0-6-0 w/e 10/09/1966 12138 Transfer out to: 30A Stratford    
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo w/e 24/09/1966 D5070 Transfer out to: 64B Haymarket    
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo 5w/e 24/09/1966 D5070 Transfer out to: 64B Haymarket    
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo m/e 10/1966 D5067 Transfer out to: 64B Haymarket    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 01/10/1966 D3128 Transfer in from: 34D Hitchin (GNR)    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 01/10/1966 D3326 Transfer in from: 34D Hitchin (GNR)    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 08/10/1966 D1760 Transfer in from: 30A Stratford    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 08/10/1966 D1773 Transfer in from: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 08/10/1966 D5588 Transfer in from: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A w/e 08/10/1966 D5590 Transfer in from: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 08/10/1966 D5599 Transfer in from: 40B Immingham    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A w/e 08/10/1966 D5677 Transfer in from: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 08/10/1966 D1530 Transfer out to: 30A Stratford    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 08/10/1966 D1531 Transfer out to: 40B Immingham    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 08/10/1966 D1533 Transfer out to: 40B Immingham    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 08/10/1966 D1534 Transfer out to: 40B Immingham    
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo w/e 08/10/1966 D5050 Transfer out to: 65A Eastfield    
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo w/e 08/10/1966 D5051 Transfer out to: 65A Eastfield    
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo w/e 08/10/1966 D5052 Transfer out to: 65A Eastfield    
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo w/e 08/10/1966 D5053 Transfer out to: 65A Eastfield    
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo w/e 08/10/1966 D5054 Transfer out to: 65A Eastfield    
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo w/e 08/10/1966 D5055 Transfer out to: 65A Eastfield    
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo w/e 08/10/1966 D5056 Transfer out to: 65A Eastfield    
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo w/e 08/10/1966 D7600 Transfer out to: 65A Eastfield    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 15/10/1966 D3711 Transfer out to: 30A Stratford    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 29/10/1966 D1761 Transfer in from: 31B March    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 29/10/1966 D1764 Transfer in from: 31B March    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 29/10/1966 D1769 Transfer in from: 40B Immingham    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 29/10/1966 D1526 Transfer out to: 30A Stratford    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 29/10/1966 D1527 Transfer out to: 31B March    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 29/10/1966 D1528 Transfer out to: 40B Immingham    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 29/10/1966 D1529 Transfer out to: 31B March    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 29/10/1966 D3128 Transfer out to: 31B March    
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 w/e 05/11/1966 D208 Transfer in from: 32B Ipswich    
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo w/e 05/11/1966 D5063 Transfer out to: 64B Haymarket    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 05/11/1966 D5586 Transfer out to: 32B Ipswich    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 26/11/1966 D1532 Transfer out to: 40B Immingham    
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 w/e 03/12/1966 D208 Transfer out to: 32B Ipswich    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 10/12/1966 D1867 Transfer in from: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 10/12/1966 D1868 Transfer in from: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 15 Bo-Bo w/e 10/12/1966 D8236 Transfer out to: 30A Stratford    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 07/01/1967 D1867 Transfer out to: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 w/e 14/01/1967 D201 Transfer in from: 32B Ipswich    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 14/01/1967 D5588 Transfer out to: 32B Ipswich    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 18/02/1967 D1539 Transfer in from: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 18/02/1967 D1541 Transfer in from: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 18/02/1967 D5588 Transfer in from: 32B Ipswich    
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 w/e 18/02/1967 D201 Transfer out to: 32B Ipswich    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 25/02/1967 D1868 Transfer out to: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A w/e 11/03/1967 D5587 Transfer out to: 32A Norwich Thorpe    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 11/03/1967 D5588 Transfer out to: 32A Norwich Thorpe    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 11/03/1967 D5589 Transfer out to: 32A Norwich Thorpe    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 18/03/1967 D1538 Transfer in from: 40B Immingham    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 18/03/1967 D1543 Transfer in from: 31B March    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 18/03/1967 D1518 Transfer out to: WL Western Lines (LMR)    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 18/03/1967 D1519 Transfer out to: WL Western Lines (LMR)    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 25/03/1967 D5579 Transfer in from: 40B Immingham    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 25/03/1967 D5580 Transfer in from: 40B Immingham    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A w/e 25/03/1967 D5587 Transfer in from: 32A Norwich Thorpe    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 25/03/1967 D5588 Transfer in from: 32A Norwich Thorpe    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 25/03/1967 D5589 Transfer in from: 32A Norwich Thorpe    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 25/03/1967 D5671 Transfer out to: 40B Immingham    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 25/03/1967 D5672 Transfer out to: 40B Immingham    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 25/03/1967 D5673 Transfer out to: 40B Immingham    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 25/03/1967 D5674 Transfer out to: 40B Immingham    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 25/03/1967 D5675 Transfer out to: 40B Immingham    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 25/03/1967 D5676 Transfer out to: 40B Immingham    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 15/04/1967 D5578 Transfer in from: 40B Immingham    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 15/04/1967 D5586 Transfer in from: 32B Ipswich    
Diesel 15 Bo-Bo w/e 15/04/1967 D8234 Transfer in from: 30A Stratford    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 15/04/1967 D5579 Transfer out to: 32A Norwich Thorpe    
Diesel 15 Bo-Bo w/e 06/05/1967 D8243 Transfer in from: 30A Stratford    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 06/05/1967 D3326 Transfer out to: 30A Stratford    
Diesel 15 Bo-Bo w/e 06/05/1967 D8234 Transfer out to: 30A Stratford    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 03/06/1967 D1867 Transfer in from: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 03/06/1967 D1868 Transfer in from: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 03/06/1967 D1524 Transfer out to: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 03/06/1967 D1525 Transfer out to: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 10/06/1967 D1518 Transfer in from: WL Western Lines (LMR)    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 10/06/1967 D1519 Transfer in from: WL Western Lines (LMR)    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 10/06/1967 D1539 Transfer out to: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 10/06/1967 D1541 Transfer out to: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 12/08/1967 D1538 Transfer out to: 40B Immingham    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 12/08/1967 D5578 Transfer out to: 32B Ipswich    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 12/08/1967 D5580 Transfer out to: 32A Norwich Thorpe    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A w/e 09/09/1967 D5677 Transfer out to: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 09/09/1967 D5678 Transfer out to: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 30/09/1967 D3710 Transfer out to: 30A Stratford    
Diesel 15 Bo-Bo w/e 07/10/1967 D8235 Transfer out to: 30A Stratford    
Diesel 15 Bo-Bo w/e 07/10/1967 D8243 Transfer out to: 30A Stratford    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 21/10/1967 D3692 Transfer out to: 30E Colchester    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 21/10/1967 D3693 Transfer out to: 30E Colchester    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 28/10/1967 D1765 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 28/10/1967 D1766 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 28/10/1967 D1767 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 28/10/1967 D1775 Transfer in from: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 28/10/1967 D1520 Transfer out to: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 28/10/1967 D1521 Transfer out to: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 28/10/1967 D1522 Transfer out to: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 28/10/1967 D1523 Transfer out to: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 25/11/1967 D1520 Transfer in from: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 25/11/1967 D1521 Transfer in from: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 25/11/1967 D1522 Transfer in from: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 25/11/1967 D1523 Transfer in from: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 25/11/1967 D1524 Transfer in from: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 25/11/1967 D1525 Transfer in from: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 25/11/1967 D1529 Transfer in from: 40B Immingham    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 25/11/1967 D1531 Transfer in from: 40B Immingham    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 25/11/1967 D1532 Transfer in from: 40B Immingham    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 25/11/1967 D1533 Transfer in from: 40B Immingham    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 25/11/1967 D1534 Transfer in from: 40B Immingham    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 25/11/1967 D1535 Transfer in from: 40B Immingham    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 25/11/1967 D1865 Transfer in from: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 25/11/1967 D1866 Transfer in from: 30A Stratford    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 25/11/1967 D1872 Transfer in from: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 25/11/1967 D1873 Transfer in from: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 25/11/1967 D1994 Transfer in from: 91N To North Eastern Region    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 25/11/1967 D1995 Transfer in from: 56A Wakefield    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 25/11/1967 D1996 Transfer in from: 56A Wakefield    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 25/11/1967 D1997 Transfer in from: 56A Wakefield    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 25/11/1967 D1500 Transfer out to: 40B Immingham    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 25/11/1967 D1501 Transfer out to: 40B Immingham    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 25/11/1967 D1502 Transfer out to: 40B Immingham    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 25/11/1967 D1503 Transfer out to: 40B Immingham    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 25/11/1967 D1504 Transfer out to: 40B Immingham    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 25/11/1967 D1505 Transfer out to: 40B Immingham    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 25/11/1967 D1506 Transfer out to: 40B Immingham    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 25/11/1967 D1507 Transfer out to: 40B Immingham    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 25/11/1967 D1508 Transfer out to: 40B Immingham    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 25/11/1967 D1509 Transfer out to: 40B Immingham    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 25/11/1967 D1510 Transfer out to: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 25/11/1967 D1511 Transfer out to: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 25/11/1967 D1512 Transfer out to: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 25/11/1967 D1513 Transfer out to: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 25/11/1967 D1514 Transfer out to: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 25/11/1967 D1515 Transfer out to: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 25/11/1967 D1516 Transfer out to: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 25/11/1967 D1517 Transfer out to: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 25/11/1967 D1518 Transfer out to: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 25/11/1967 D1519 Transfer out to: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 55 Co-Co w/e 02/12/1967 D9000 Transfer in from: 64B Haymarket    
Diesel 55 Co-Co w/e 02/12/1967 D9016 Transfer in from: 64B Haymarket    
Diesel 55 Co-Co w/e 02/12/1967 D9019 Transfer in from: 64B Haymarket    
Diesel 47 Co-Co 4w/e 02/12/1967 D1994 Transfer out to: 91E To Eastern Region    
Diesel 55 Co-Co w/e 02/12/1967 D9001 Transfer out to: 64B Haymarket    
Diesel 55 Co-Co w/e 02/12/1967 D9003 Transfer out to: 64B Haymarket    
Diesel 55 Co-Co w/e 02/12/1967 D9009 Transfer out to: 64B Haymarket    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 09/12/1967 D3331 Transfer out to: 30E Colchester    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 20/01/1968 D5639 Transfer out to: 30A Stratford    
Diesel 55 Co-Co w/e 10/02/1968 D9013 Transfer in from: 64B Haymarket    
Diesel 55 Co-Co w/e 10/02/1968 D9012 Transfer out to: 64B Haymarket    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 09/03/1968 D3332 Transfer out to: 30A Stratford    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 09/03/1968 D5589 Transfer out to: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 09/03/1968 D5592 Transfer out to: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 15 Bo-Bo w/e 13/04/1968 D8230 Transfer out to: 30A Stratford    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 11/05/1968 D1520 Transfer out to: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 11/05/1968 D1521 Transfer out to: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 11/05/1968 D1522 Transfer out to: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 11/05/1968 D1523 Transfer out to: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 11/05/1968 D1524 Transfer out to: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 11/05/1968 D1525 Transfer out to: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 08/06/1968 D1523 Transfer in from: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 08/06/1968 D1769 Transfer out to: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 08/06/1968 D3307 Transfer out to: 30E Colchester    
Diesel 55 Co-Co w/e 22/06/1968 D9001 Transfer in from: 64B Haymarket    
Diesel 55 Co-Co w/e 22/06/1968 D9003 Transfer in from: 64B Haymarket    
Diesel 55 Co-Co w/e 22/06/1968 D9009 Transfer in from: 64B Haymarket    
Diesel 55 Co-Co w/e 22/06/1968 D9012 Transfer in from: 64B Haymarket    
Diesel 55 Co-Co 3w/e 29/06/1968 D9000 Transfer out to: 64B Haymarket    
Diesel 55 Co-Co 3w/e 29/06/1968 D9013 Transfer out to: 64B Haymarket    
Diesel 55 Co-Co 3w/e 29/06/1968 D9016 Transfer out to: 64B Haymarket    
Diesel 55 Co-Co 3w/e 29/06/1968 D9019 Transfer out to: 64B Haymarket    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A w/e 10/08/1968 D5592 Transfer in from: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A w/e 24/08/1968 D5589 Transfer in from: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 24/08/1968 D5602 Transfer out to: 40B Immingham    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 24/08/1968 D5622 Transfer out to: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 23 Bo-Bo on 30/09/1968 D5906 Condemned      
Diesel 15 Bo-Bo w/e 06/10/1968 D8232 Condemned      
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 12/10/1968 D1103 Transfer in from: 51L Thornaby    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 12/10/1968 D1104 Transfer in from: 51L Thornaby    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 12/10/1968 D1105 Transfer in from: 51L Thornaby    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 12/10/1968 D1106 Transfer in from: 51L Thornaby    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 12/10/1968 D1107 Transfer in from: 51L Thornaby    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 12/10/1968 D1762 Transfer in from: 40B Immingham    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 12/10/1968 D1763 Transfer in from: 40B Immingham    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 12/10/1968 D1523 Transfer out to: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 12/10/1968 D1529 Transfer out to: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 12/10/1968 D1531 Transfer out to: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 12/10/1968 D1532 Transfer out to: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 12/10/1968 D1533 Transfer out to: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 12/10/1968 D1534 Transfer out to: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 12/10/1968 D1535 Transfer out to: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 12/10/1968 D1543 Transfer out to: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 15 Bo-Bo w/e 13/10/1968 D8232 Reinstated 98W      
Diesel 23 Bo-Bo on 20/10/1968 D5907 Condemned      
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A w/e 28/12/1968 D5547 Transfer in from: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A w/e 28/12/1968 D5602 Transfer in from: 40B Immingham    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 28/12/1968 D3309 Transfer out to: 30A Stratford    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 28/12/1968 D3311 Transfer out to: 30A Stratford    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 28/12/1968 D3312 Transfer out to: 40B Immingham    
Diesel 23 Bo-Bo on 30/12/1968 D5900 Condemned      
Diesel 23 Bo-Bo on 30/12/1968 D5903 Condemned      
Diesel 23 Bo-Bo on 20/01/1969 D5904 Condemned      
Diesel 15 Bo-Bo on 16/02/1969 D8233 Condemned      
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 22/02/1969 D4040 Transfer in from: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 22/02/1969 D4041 Transfer in from: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A w/e 22/02/1969 D5568 Transfer in from: 32A Norwich Thorpe    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A w/e 22/02/1969 D5622 Transfer in from: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 22/02/1969 D3308 Transfer out to: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 22/02/1969 D3310 Transfer out to: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 08/03/1969 D3709 Transfer in from: 34D Hitchin (GNR)    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 08/03/1969 D3704 Transfer out to: 34D Hitchin (GNR)    
Diesel 23 Bo-Bo on 09/03/1969 D5908 Condemned      
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A w/e 15/03/1969 D5537 Transfer in from: 30A Stratford    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A w/e 15/03/1969 D5679 Transfer in from: 31B March    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 15/03/1969 D5652 Transfer out to: 30A Stratford    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 15/03/1969 D5653 Transfer out to: 31B March    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 29/03/1969 D1998 Transfer in from: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A w/e 29/03/1969 D5655 Transfer in from: 40B Immingham    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 05/04/1969 D1999 Transfer in from: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 17/05/1969 D1871 Transfer in from: 40B Immingham    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 17/05/1969 D1983 Transfer in from: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 17/05/1969 D5627 Transfer out to: 31B March    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 17/05/1969 D5650 Transfer out to: 30A Stratford    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 17/05/1969 D5651 Transfer out to: 30A Stratford    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 24/05/1969 D1768 Transfer in from: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A w/e 07/06/1969 D5537 Transfer out to: 30A Stratford    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A w/e 07/06/1969 D5547 Transfer out to: 40B Immingham    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A w/e 07/06/1969 D5655 Transfer out to: 40B Immingham    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A w/e 07/06/1969 D5679 Transfer out to: 30A Stratford    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A w/e 05/07/1969 D5568 Transfer out to: 40B Immingham    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 05/07/1969 D5586 Transfer out to: 40B Immingham    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 09/08/1969 D1995 Transfer out to: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 09/08/1969 D1996 Transfer out to: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 09/08/1969 D1997 Transfer out to: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 09/08/1969 D1998 Transfer out to: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 09/08/1969 D1999 Transfer out to: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 09/08/1969 D3705 Transfer out to: 55A Holbeck (MR)    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 16/08/1969 D1504 Transfer in from: 40B Immingham    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 16/08/1969 D1871 Transfer out to: 40B Immingham    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 23/08/1969 D1503 Transfer in from: 40B Immingham    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 23/08/1969 D1507 Transfer in from: 40B Immingham    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 23/08/1969 D1868 Transfer out to: 40B Immingham    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 23/08/1969 D1873 Transfer out to: 40B Immingham    
Diesel 23 Bo-Bo w/e 06/09/1969 D5901 Transfer out to: 92D Research Department (Derby)    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 13/09/1969 D1517 Transfer in from: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 27/09/1969 D1501 Transfer in from: 40B Immingham    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 27/09/1969 D1505 Transfer in from: 40B Immingham    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 27/09/1969 D1510 Transfer in from: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 27/09/1969 D1866 Transfer out to: 40B Immingham    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 27/09/1969 D1874 Transfer out to: 40B Immingham    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 27/09/1969 D1983 Transfer out to: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 04/10/1969 D1506 Transfer in from: 40B Immingham    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 04/10/1969 D1865 Transfer out to: 40B Immingham    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 11/10/1969 D1508 Transfer in from: 40B Immingham    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 11/10/1969 D1510 Transfer out to: 55B York (North)    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 11/10/1969 D1517 Transfer out to: 55B York (North)    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 11/10/1969 D1766 Transfer out to: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 11/10/1969 D1767 Transfer out to: 55B York (North)    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 11/10/1969 D1867 Transfer out to: 40B Immingham    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A w/e 11/10/1969 D5622 Transfer out to: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 18/10/1969 D1768 Transfer out to: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 01/11/1969 D1502 Transfer in from: 40B Immingham    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 01/11/1969 D1509 Transfer in from: 40B Immingham    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 01/11/1969 D1510 Transfer in from: 55B York (North)    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 01/11/1969 D1773 Transfer out to: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 01/11/1969 D1775 Transfer out to: 40B Immingham    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 01/11/1969 D1872 Transfer out to: 40B Immingham    
Diesel 23 Bo-Bo on 23/11/1969 D5902 Condemned      
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 13/12/1969 D1511 Transfer in from: 55B York (North)    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 13/12/1969 D1765 Transfer out to: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A w/e 07/02/1970 D5616 Transfer in from: 31B March    
Diesel 15 Bo-Bo w/e 21/02/1970 D8230 Transfer in from: 30A Stratford    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 21/03/1970 D1765 Transfer in from: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 21/03/1970 D1766 Transfer in from: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 21/03/1970 D1767 Transfer in from: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 21/03/1970 D1768 Transfer in from: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 21/03/1970 D1773 Transfer in from: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 21/03/1970 D1103 Transfer out to: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 21/03/1970 D1104 Transfer out to: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 21/03/1970 D1105 Transfer out to: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 21/03/1970 D1106 Transfer out to: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 21/03/1970 D1107 Transfer out to: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 28/03/1970 D1512 Transfer in from: 55B York (North)    
Diesel 15 Bo-Bo w/e 04/04/1970 D8201 Transfer in from: 30A Stratford    
Diesel 15 Bo-Bo w/e 04/04/1970 D8230 Transfer out to: 30A Stratford    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A w/e 09/05/1970 D5617 Transfer in from: 40B Immingham    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A w/e 09/05/1970 D5622 Transfer in from: 40B Immingham    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A w/e 09/05/1970 D5627 Transfer in from: 31B March    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A w/e 09/05/1970 D5628 Transfer in from: 31B March    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A w/e 09/05/1970 D5677 Transfer in from: 40B Immingham    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A w/e 06/06/1970 D5618 Transfer in from: 40B Immingham    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A w/e 06/06/1970 D5617 Transfer out to: 40B Immingham    
Diesel 47 Co-Co 4w/e 11/07/1970 D1767 Transfer out to: 40B Immingham    
Diesel 47 Co-Co 4w/e 11/07/1970 D1768 Transfer out to: 55B York (North)    
Diesel 47 Co-Co 4w/e 11/07/1970 D1773 Transfer out to: 40B Immingham    
Diesel 15 Bo-Bo w/e 01/08/1970 D8201 Transfer out to: 30A Stratford    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A w/e 10/10/1970 D5628 Transfer out to: 31B March    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A w/e 07/11/1970 D5678 Transfer in from: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 15 Bo-Bo w/e 12/12/1970 D8231 Transfer out to: 30A Stratford    
Diesel 15 Bo-Bo w/e 12/12/1970 D8232 Transfer out to: 30A Stratford    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 23/01/1971 D1500 Transfer in from: 40B Immingham    
Diesel 23 Bo-Bo on 14/02/1971 D5905 Condemned      
Diesel 23 Bo-Bo on 17/03/1971 D5909 Condemned      
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A w/e 03/04/1971 D5616 Transfer out to: 30A Stratford    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A w/e 03/04/1971 D5618 Transfer out to: 30A Stratford    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 08/05/1971 D3690 Transfer in from: 34D Hitchin (GNR)    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 08/05/1971 D3691 Transfer in from: 34D Hitchin (GNR)    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A w/e 08/05/1971 D5586 Transfer in from: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 08/05/1971 D3709 Transfer out to: 34D Hitchin (GNR)    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 08/05/1971 D3712 Transfer out to: 34D Hitchin (GNR)    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 08/05/1971 D3718 Transfer out to: 30A Stratford    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 22/05/1971 D3709 Transfer in from: 34D Hitchin (GNR)    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 22/05/1971 D3713 Transfer out to: 34D Hitchin (GNR)    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 2w/e 04/09/1971 D3706 Transfer out to: 30A Stratford    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A w/e 18/09/1971 D5549 Transfer in from: 40B Immingham    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A w/e 18/09/1971 D5802 Transfer in from: 40B Immingham    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 09/10/1971 D1513 Transfer in from: 55B York (North)    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 09/10/1971 D1514 Transfer in from: 55B York (North)    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 09/10/1971 D1516 Transfer in from: 55B York (North)    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A w/e 09/10/1971 D5650 Transfer in from: 30A Stratford    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A w/e 09/10/1971 D5651 Transfer in from: 30A Stratford    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A w/e 09/10/1971 D5652 Transfer in from: 30A Stratford    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A w/e 09/10/1971 D5653 Transfer in from: 30A Stratford    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A w/e 09/10/1971 D5549 Transfer out to: 30A Stratford    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A w/e 09/10/1971 D5587 Transfer out to: 55B York (North)    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A w/e 09/10/1971 D5591 Transfer out to: 55A Holbeck (MR)    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A w/e 09/10/1971 D5594 Transfer out to: 55A Holbeck (MR)    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 09/10/1971 D5596 Transfer out to: 55A Holbeck (MR)    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 09/10/1971 D5597 Transfer out to: 55A Holbeck (MR)    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 09/10/1971 D5598 Transfer out to: 40B Immingham    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 09/10/1971 D5600 Transfer out to: 55B York (North)    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 09/10/1971 D5603 Transfer out to: 55A Holbeck (MR)    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A w/e 09/10/1971 D5802 Transfer out to: 30A Stratford    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 13/11/1971 D3688 Transfer in from: 34D Hitchin (GNR)    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A w/e 11/12/1971 D5656 Transfer in from: 30A Stratford    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 11/12/1971 D5654 Transfer out to: 30A Stratford    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A 2w/e 01/01/1972 D5616 Transfer in from: 55B York (North)    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A 2w/e 01/01/1972 D5599 Transfer out to: 55B York (North)    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 08/01/1972 D1104 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 08/01/1972 D1705 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 08/01/1972 D3876 Transfer in from: 36A Doncaster    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 08/01/1972 D1763 Transfer out to: D02 Birmingham Division    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 08/01/1972 D5606 Transfer out to: 51L Thornaby    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A 2w/e 08/04/1972 D5669 Transfer in from: 31B March    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A 2w/e 08/04/1972 D5653 Transfer out to: 31B March    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A w/e 22/04/1972 D5596 Transfer in from: 55A Holbeck (MR)    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 22/04/1972 D5607 Transfer out to: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A w/e 06/05/1972 D5653 Transfer in from: 31B March    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A w/e 06/05/1972 D5654 Transfer in from: 31B March    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 06/05/1972 D1705 Transfer out to: 30A Stratford    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 06/05/1972 D1760 Transfer out to: 30A Stratford    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A w/e 24/06/1972 D5599 Transfer in from: 55B York (North)    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A w/e 24/06/1972 D5656 Transfer out to: 55A Holbeck (MR)    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A w/e 08/07/1972 D5654 Transfer out to: 40B Immingham    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A w/e 29/07/1972 D5606 Transfer in from: 51L Thornaby    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A w/e 29/07/1972 D5669 Transfer out to: 55A Holbeck (MR)    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 12/08/1972 D1518 Transfer in from: 55B York (North)    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 07/10/1972 D1519 Transfer in from: 55B York (North)    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 07/10/1972 D5647 Transfer out to: 31B March    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 04/11/1972 D1515 Transfer in from: 55A Holbeck (MR)    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 04/11/1972 D1517 Transfer in from: 55A Holbeck (MR)    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 04/11/1972 D3708 Transfer in from: 34D Hitchin (GNR)    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 04/11/1972 D1104 Transfer out to: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 04/11/1972 D1766 Transfer out to: 55A Holbeck (MR)    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 04/11/1972 D3724 Transfer out to: 34D Hitchin (GNR)    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A w/e 11/11/1972 D5586 Transfer out to: 40B Immingham    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 02/12/1972 D3716 Transfer out to: 30A Stratford    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 06/01/1973 D1518 Transfer out to: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 06/01/1973 D1519 Transfer out to: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 06/01/1973 D1765 Transfer out to: 30A Stratford    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 06/01/1973 31180 Transfer out to: D16 Nottingham Division    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A w/e 03/03/1973 31249 Transfer out to: D16 Nottingham Division    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 2w/e 10/03/1973 D3086 Transfer in from: 31B March    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A 2w/e 10/03/1973 31174 Transfer in from: 40B Immingham    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A 2w/e 10/03/1973 31176 Transfer in from: 40B Immingham    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A 2w/e 10/03/1973 31177 Transfer in from: 40B Immingham    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A 2w/e 10/03/1973 31180 Transfer in from: D16 Nottingham Division    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A 2w/e 10/03/1973 31182 Transfer in from: 40B Immingham    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A 2w/e 10/03/1973 31221 Transfer in from: 31B March    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A 2w/e 10/03/1973 31228 Transfer in from: 40B Immingham    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A 2w/e 10/03/1973 D5639 Transfer in from: 31B March    
Diesel 47 Co-Co 2w/e 10/03/1973 D1762 Transfer out to: 30A Stratford    
Diesel 47 Co-Co 2w/e 10/03/1973 D1764 Transfer out to: 30A Stratford    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A w/e 31/03/1973 31249 Transfer in from: D16 Nottingham Division    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A w/e 31/03/1973 31181 Transfer out to: D16 Nottingham Division    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A w/e 21/04/1973 31181 Transfer in from: D16 Nottingham Division    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 21/04/1973 31173 Transfer out to: 16A Toton    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 19/05/1973 D1762 Transfer in from: 30A Stratford    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 19/05/1973 D1763 Transfer in from: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 19/05/1973 D1764 Transfer in from: 30A Stratford    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 19/05/1973 D1779 Transfer in from: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A w/e 19/05/1973 31103 Transfer in from: 55B York (North)    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A w/e 19/05/1973 31173 Transfer in from: 16A Toton    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A w/e 19/05/1973 31194 Transfer in from: 55B York (North)    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 19/05/1973 D1516 Transfer out to: HO Holbeck (MR)    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 19/05/1973 D1517 Transfer out to: HO Holbeck (MR)    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A w/e 02/06/1973 31207 Transfer in from: 31B March    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A w/e 02/06/1973 31209 Transfer in from: 31B March    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A w/e 02/06/1973 31210 Transfer in from: 31B March    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A w/e 02/06/1973 31214 Transfer in from: 31B March    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A w/e 02/06/1973 31174 Transfer out to: MC March    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A w/e 02/06/1973 31176 Transfer out to: MC March    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A w/e 02/06/1973 31177 Transfer out to: MC March    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A w/e 02/06/1973 31182 Transfer out to: MC March    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A 2w/e 07/07/1973 31324 Transfer in from: SX Stratford    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 11/08/1973 D1761 Transfer out to: IM Immingham    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 11/08/1973 D1762 Transfer out to: IM Immingham    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 11/08/1973 D1763 Transfer out to: IM Immingham    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 11/08/1973 D1764 Transfer out to: IM Immingham    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A 4w/e 06/10/1973 31125 Transfer in from: 51L Thornaby    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A 4w/e 06/10/1973 31126 Transfer in from: 51L Thornaby    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A 4w/e 06/10/1973 31195 Transfer in from: 40B Immingham    
Diesel 47 Co-Co 4w/e 06/10/1973 D1512 Transfer out to: GD Gateshead    
Diesel 47 Co-Co 4w/e 06/10/1973 D1513 Transfer out to: GD Gateshead    
Diesel 47 Co-Co 4w/e 06/10/1973 D1514 Transfer out to: GD Gateshead    
Diesel 47 Co-Co 4w/e 06/10/1973 D1515 Transfer out to: GD Gateshead    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A 4w/e 06/10/1973 31249 Transfer out to: YK York (North)    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A 4w/e 06/10/1973 31250 Transfer out to: YK York (North)    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A 4w/e 06/10/1973 D5588 Transfer out to: MR March    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A w/e 10/11/1973 31249 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A w/e 10/11/1973 31227 Transfer out to: YK York (North)    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A w/e 09/03/1974 31108 Transfer in from: 31B March    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A w/e 09/03/1974 31115 Transfer in from: 31B March    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A w/e 09/03/1974 31157 Transfer in from: 31B March    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A w/e 09/03/1974 31248 Transfer in from: 40B Immingham    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A w/e 09/03/1974 31171 Transfer out to: GD Gateshead    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A w/e 09/03/1974 31173 Transfer out to: GD Gateshead    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 09/03/1974 31175 Transfer out to: GD Gateshead    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A w/e 09/03/1974 31178 Transfer out to: GD Gateshead    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A w/e 09/03/1974 31180 Transfer out to: IM Immingham    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A w/e 11/05/1974 31159 Transfer in from: 31B March    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 11/05/1974 47411 Transfer out to: GD Gateshead    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 11/05/1974 47412 Transfer out to: GD Gateshead    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 2w/e 31/08/1974 08044 Transfer in from: DR Doncaster    
Diesel 47 Co-Co 2w/e 12/10/1974 47411 Transfer in from: GD Gateshead    
Diesel 47 Co-Co 2w/e 12/10/1974 47412 Transfer in from: GD Gateshead    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A 2w/e 09/11/1974 31134 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A 2w/e 09/11/1974 31227 Transfer in from: TI Tinsley    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A 2w/e 09/11/1974 31115 Transfer out to: YK York (North)    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A w/e 09/11/1974 31157 Transfer out to: CW Cricklewood East    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A 2w/e 30/11/1974 31264 Transfer in from: IM Immingham    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A 2w/e 30/11/1974 31134 Transfer out to: IM Immingham    
Diesel 47 Co-Co 2w/e 11/01/1975 47413 Transfer in from: GD Gateshead    
Diesel 47 Co-Co 2w/e 11/01/1975 47414 Transfer in from: GD Gateshead    
Diesel 47 Co-Co 2w/e 11/01/1975 47415 Transfer in from: GD Gateshead    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 2w/e 11/01/1975 08044 Transfer out to: HI Hitchin (GNR)    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A w/e 08/03/1975 31171 Transfer in from: GD Gateshead    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A w/e 08/03/1975 31173 Transfer in from: GD Gateshead    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A w/e 08/03/1975 31174 Transfer in from: MC March    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A w/e 08/03/1975 31184 Transfer in from: 55A Holbeck (MR)    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 08/03/1975 31200 Transfer out to: TI Tinsley    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 08/03/1975 31216 Transfer out to: TI Tinsley    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A w/e 08/03/1975 31221 Transfer out to: TI Tinsley    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A w/e 08/03/1975 31228 Transfer out to: TI Tinsley    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A 3w/e 10/05/1975 31213 Transfer in from: SF Stratford    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A 3w/e 10/05/1975 31255 Transfer in from: SF Stratford    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 3w/e 12/07/1975 08834 Transfer in from: 86B Ebbw Junction (Newport)    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 20/09/1975 08071 Transfer out to: HI Hitchin (GNR)    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A 2w/e 11/10/1975 31418 Transfer in from: CD Cricklewood East    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 07/12/1975 08859 Transfer in from: DR Doncaster    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 13/12/1975 08550 Transfer out to: HI Hitchin (GNR)    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 3w/e 04/01/1976 08872 Transfer out to: GD Gateshead    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A 3w/e 02/05/1976 31168 Transfer in from: 40B Immingham    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A 3w/e 02/05/1976 31411 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A 3w/e 02/05/1976 31422 Transfer in from: 91M To London Midland Region    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A 3w/e 02/05/1976 31422 Transfer in from: CW Cricklewood East    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A 3w/e 02/05/1976 31423 Transfer in from: 91M To London Midland Region    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A 3w/e 02/05/1976 31424 Transfer in from: CW Cricklewood East    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A 3w/e 02/05/1976 31103 Transfer out to: SF Stratford    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A 3w/e 02/05/1976 31159 Transfer out to: IM Immingham    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A 3w/e 02/05/1976 31209 Transfer out to: 91W To Western Region / GWR    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A 3w/e 02/05/1976 31210 Transfer out to: 91W To Western Region / GWR    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A 3w/e 02/05/1976 31213 Transfer out to: 91W To Western Region / GWR    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A 3w/e 02/05/1976 31418 Transfer out to: GD Gateshead    
Diesel 47 Co-Co 3w/e 02/05/1976 47415 Transfer out to: GD Gateshead    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A w/e 23/05/1976 31234 Transfer in from: 31B March    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A w/e 23/05/1976 31237 Transfer in from: 31B March    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A w/e 23/05/1976 31195 Transfer out to: MR March    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A w/e 23/05/1976 31255 Transfer out to: MR March    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 12/12/1976 47403 Transfer in from: 34G Finsbury Park    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 12/12/1976 47403 Transfer out to: FP Finsbury Park    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 3w/e 31/12/1976 08180 Reinstated 98S      
Diesel 47 Co-Co 5w/e 31/12/1976 47403 Transfer out to: 91E To Eastern Region    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 2w/e 10/03/1979 08180 Transfer out to: MR March    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 m/e 31/03/1979 08556 Transfer out to: SU Selhurst    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A m/e 30/11/1979 31171 Transfer out to: HM Healey Mills    
Diesel 55 Co-Co on 05/01/1980 55001 Condemned      
Diesel 55 Co-Co on 06/01/1980 55020 Condemned      
Diesel 08 0-6-0 on 28/09/1980 08545 Condemned      
Diesel 55 Co-Co on 31/12/1980 55003 Condemned      
Diesel 55 Co-Co on 18/05/1981 55012 Condemned      
Diesel 08 0-6-0 on 31/05/1981 08553 Condemned      
Diesel 55 Co-Co on 12/10/1981 55018 Condemned      
Diesel 55 Co-Co on 31/12/1981 55007 Condemned      
Diesel 55 Co-Co on 02/01/1982 55009 Condemned      
Diesel 55 Co-Co on 02/01/1982 55015 Condemned      
Diesel 08 0-6-0 on 15/08/1982 08555 Condemned      
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A on 10/10/1982 31192 Condemned      
Diesel 08 0-6-0 on 31/10/1982 08551 Condemned      
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A on 15/05/1983 31214 Condemned      
Diesel 08 0-6-0 on 26/01/1986 08558 Condemned      
Diesel 47 Co-Co on 02/03/1986 47405 Condemned      
Diesel 47 Co-Co on 07/03/1986 47414 Condemned      
Diesel 47 Co-Co on 20/07/1986 47408 Condemned      
Diesel 47 Co-Co on 31/08/1986 47409 Condemned      
Diesel 47 Co-Co on 12/05/1987 47412 Condemned      
Diesel 47 Co-Co on 05/06/1987 47404 Condemned      
Diesel 47 Co-Co on 05/06/1987 47410 Condemned      
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A on 31/03/1988 31401 Condemned      
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A on 20/04/1988 31218 Condemned      
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A w/e 15/05/1988 31215 Transfer out to: TE Thornaby    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 15/05/1988 31223 Transfer out to: CD Crewe Diesel    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A w/e 15/05/1988 31225 Transfer out to: CD Crewe Diesel    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A w/e 15/05/1988 31227 Transfer out to: CD Crewe Diesel    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A w/e 15/05/1988 31248 Transfer out to: BS Bescot    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A w/e 15/05/1988 31249 Transfer out to: CD Crewe Diesel    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A w/e 15/05/1988 31264 Transfer out to: TE Thornaby    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A w/e 15/05/1988 31402 Transfer out to: CD Crewe Diesel    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 15/05/1988 31404 Transfer out to: CD Crewe Diesel    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A w/e 15/05/1988 31405 Transfer out to: CD Crewe Diesel    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A w/e 15/05/1988 31406 Transfer out to: CD Crewe Diesel    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 15/05/1988 31407 Transfer out to: CD Crewe Diesel    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 15/05/1988 31408 Transfer out to: CD Crewe Diesel    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A w/e 15/05/1988 31411 Transfer out to: CD Crewe Diesel    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A w/e 15/05/1988 31422 Transfer out to: CD Crewe Diesel    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A w/e 15/05/1988 31423 Transfer out to: CD Crewe Diesel    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A w/e 15/05/1988 31424 Transfer out to: CD Crewe Diesel    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 15/05/1988 47401 Transfer out to: IM Immingham    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 15/05/1988 47402 Transfer out to: IM Immingham    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 15/05/1988 47406 Transfer out to: IM Immingham    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 15/05/1988 47407 Transfer out to: IM Immingham    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 15/05/1988 47411 Transfer out to: IM Immingham    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 15/05/1988 47413 Transfer out to: IM Immingham    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A on 22/05/1988 31183 Transfer out to: IM Immingham    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A on 05/06/1988 31184 Transfer out to: TE Thornaby    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A on 13/10/1988 31222 Condemned      
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A on 28/10/1988 31202 Condemned      
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A on 03/01/1989 31226 Condemned      
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A on 14/04/1989 31173 Condemned      
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A on 26/05/1989 31189 Condemned      
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A on 16/03/1990 31198 Condemned      
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A on 27/09/1991 31108 Condemned      
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A on 20/12/1991 31168 Condemned      
Diesel 08 0-6-0 on 17/07/1992 08544 Condemned      
Diesel 08 0-6-0 on 11/12/1992 08859 Condemned      
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A on 16/04/1993 31324 Condemned      
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A on 11/06/1993 31234 Condemned      
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A on 08/07/1993 31217 Condemned      
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A on 01/03/1996 31220 Condemned      
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A on 24/01/1999 31188 Condemned      
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A on 01/02/1999 31194 Condemned      
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A on 14/01/2000 31126 Condemned      
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A on 04/02/2000 31403 Condemned      
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A on 18/02/2000 31219 Condemned      
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A on 03/03/2000 31187 Condemned      
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A on 24/03/2000 31201 Condemned      
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A on 31/03/2000 31185 Condemned      
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A on 05/05/2000 31199 Condemned      
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A on 16/06/2000 31237 Condemned      
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A on 30/06/2000 31224 Condemned      
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A on 13/03/2003 31181 Condemned      
Diesel 47 Co-Co on 01/02/2004 47585 Condemned      
Diesel 08 0-6-0 on 30/06/2005 08529 Condemned      
Diesel 08 0-6-0 on 01/12/2006 08873 Condemned      
Diesel 08 0-6-0 on 28/02/2007 08526 Condemned