Depot: Frodingham
Type | Class | Wheels | Period | Date | Number | Event | Code | Depot | Length of Stay | Notes |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 08/06/1932 | 6074 | Transfer in from: | KEA | Keadby | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 11/06/1932 | 6518 | Transfer in from: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 11/06/1932 | 6568 | Transfer in from: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/06/1932 | 5352 | Transfer in from: | KEA | Keadby | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/06/1932 | 6215 | Transfer in from: | KEA | Keadby | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/06/1932 | 6223 | Transfer in from: | KEA | Keadby | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/06/1932 | 6237 | Transfer in from: | KEA | Keadby | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/06/1932 | 6242 | Transfer in from: | KEA | Keadby | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/06/1932 | 6243 | Transfer in from: | KEA | Keadby | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/06/1932 | 6248 | Transfer in from: | KEA | Keadby | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/06/1932 | 6250 | Transfer in from: | KEA | Keadby | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/06/1932 | 6362 | Transfer in from: | KEA | Keadby | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/06/1932 | 6366 | Transfer in from: | KEA | Keadby | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/06/1932 | 6515 | Transfer in from: | KEA | Keadby | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/06/1932 | 6569 | Transfer in from: | KEA | Keadby | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/06/1932 | 6572 | Transfer in from: | KEA | Keadby | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 18/06/1932 | 5039 | Transfer in from: | KEA | Keadby | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 18/06/1932 | 5085 | Transfer in from: | KEA | Keadby | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 18/06/1932 | 5139 | Transfer in from: | KEA | Keadby | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 18/06/1932 | 5140 | Transfer in from: | KEA | Keadby | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 18/06/1932 | 5147 | Transfer in from: | KEA | Keadby | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 18/06/1932 | 5150 | Transfer in from: | KEA | Keadby | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 18/06/1932 | 5151 | Transfer in from: | KEA | Keadby | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 18/06/1932 | 5153 | Transfer in from: | KEA | Keadby | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 18/06/1932 | 5164 | Transfer in from: | KEA | Keadby | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 18/06/1932 | 5356 | Transfer in from: | KEA | Keadby | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 18/06/1932 | 5964 | Transfer in from: | KEA | Keadby | ||
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | on | 15/09/1932 | 5273 | Transfer in from: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | on | 20/09/1932 | 5369 | Transfer in from: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 19/08/1933 | 6191 | Transfer in from: | LIN | Lincoln | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 30/11/1933 | 6642 | Transfer in from: | TUX | Tuxford | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 02/12/1933 | 5353 | Transfer in from: | LIN | Lincoln | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 05/02/1934 | 5005 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 17/02/1934 | 5377 | Transfer in from: | LIN | Lincoln | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 18/08/1934 | 5139 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 01/09/1934 | 6571 | Transfer in from: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 04/09/1934 | 5334 | Transfer in from: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 21/02/1935 | 6260 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | m/e | 01/1936 | 5961 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 01/1936 | 6002 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 20/01/1936 | 6074 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 31/01/1936 | 5961 | Transfer in from: | FRO | Frodingham | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 31/01/1936 | 5961 | Transfer out to: | FRO | Frodingham | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 08/05/1937 | 5356 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 27/11/1937 | 5140 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 30/08/1938 | 5964 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 07/01/1939 | 5039 | Transfer out to: | BRN | Barnsley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 22/01/1939 | 6242 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/02/1939 | 6226 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 19/02/1939 | 5164 | Transfer out to: | BRN | Barnsley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 03/03/1939 | 6523 | Transfer in from: | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 03/03/1939 | 6534 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 06/03/1939 | 5150 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/03/1939 | 6538 | Transfer in from: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/03/1939 | 6636 | Transfer in from: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 17/03/1939 | 6525 | Transfer in from: | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/03/1939 | 6255 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 16/05/1939 | 5151 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 09/06/1939 | 6516 | Transfer in from: | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 22/08/1939 | 5961 | Transfer out to: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/08/1939 | 5019 | Transfer in from: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 27/08/1939 | 5147 | Transfer out to: | BFD | Bradford Hammerton Street | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 05/09/1939 | 6263 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 13/09/1939 | 6561 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 13/09/1939 | 5085 | Transfer out to: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 28/09/1939 | 6239 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 28/09/1939 | 6323 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 14/09/1941 | 721 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 21/09/1941 | 705 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 21/09/1941 | 742 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | on | 04/10/1941 | 5369 | Transfer out to: | NEA | Neasden | ||
Steam | A7 | 4-6-2T | on | 08/10/1941 | 1190 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 13/10/1941 | 775 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/10/1941 | 779 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Q1 | 0-8-0T | on | 11/07/1942 | 5058 | Transfer in from: | BRN | Barnsley | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-8-0T | on | 09/11/1942 | 5058 | Transfer out to: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | A7 | 4-6-2T | on | 23/06/1943 | 1190 | Transfer out to: | SBK | Starbeck | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 04/07/1943 | 4633 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 04/07/1943 | 4634 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 04/07/1943 | 4637 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 04/07/1943 | 4673 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 25/07/1943 | 5966 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 25/07/1943 | 6280 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 25/07/1943 | 6284 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 25/07/1943 | 6592 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 25/07/1943 | 4633 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 25/07/1943 | 4634 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 25/07/1943 | 4637 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 25/07/1943 | 4673 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 09/08/1943 | 5153 | Transfer out to: | BRN | Barnsley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 13/08/1943 | 6192 | Transfer in from: | BRN | Barnsley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 29/09/1943 | 6365 | Transfer in from: | DFU | Dunfermline Upper | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 11/09/1944 | 6255 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 11/09/1944 | 6571 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/09/1944 | 6192 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/09/1944 | 6568 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | on | 16/11/1944 | 5273 | Transfer out to: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 06/12/1944 | 5022 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 06/12/1944 | 6515 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 22/12/1944 | 6226 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 24/12/1944 | 6263 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 24/12/1944 | 6561 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/01/1945 | 6281 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/01/1945 | 6243 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 16/09/1945 | 6190 | Transfer in from: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 16/09/1945 | 6543 | Transfer in from: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 16/09/1945 | 6548 | Transfer in from: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 04/11/1945 | 6321 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 04/11/1945 | 6642 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 02/12/1945 | 5399 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 02/12/1945 | 6354 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 02/12/1945 | 6361 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 02/12/1945 | 6604 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O3 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/04/1946 | 3456 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O3 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/04/1946 | 3459 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O3 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/04/1946 | 3460 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O3 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/04/1946 | 3462 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O3 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/04/1946 | 3463 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O3 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/04/1946 | 3464 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O3 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/04/1946 | 3465 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O3 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/04/1946 | 3466 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O3 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/04/1946 | 3467 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O3 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/04/1946 | 3468 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O3 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/04/1946 | 3470 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O3 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/04/1946 | 3471 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O3 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/04/1946 | 3472 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O3 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/04/1946 | 3473 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O3 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/04/1946 | 3474 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O3 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/04/1946 | 3475 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O3 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/04/1946 | 3476 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/04/1946 | 6356 | Transfer in from: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/04/1946 | 6364 | Transfer in from: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/04/1946 | 3507 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/04/1946 | 5005 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/04/1946 | 5353 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/04/1946 | 5399 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/04/1946 | 5966 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/04/1946 | 6190 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/04/1946 | 6191 | Transfer out to: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/04/1946 | 6250 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/04/1946 | 6354 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/04/1946 | 6361 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/04/1946 | 6518 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/04/1946 | 6523 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/04/1946 | 6534 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/04/1946 | 6543 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/04/1946 | 6548 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/04/1946 | 6572 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/04/1946 | 6604 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 14/04/1946 | 6213 | Transfer in from: | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 14/04/1946 | 3702 | Transfer out to: | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | O3 | 2-8-0 | on | 25/04/1946 | 3458 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 28/04/1946 | 5381 | Transfer in from: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | O3 | 2-8-0 | on | 04/05/1946 | 3457 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 05/05/1946 | 3796 | Transfer in from: | TUX | Tuxford | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 05/05/1946 | 6223 | Transfer out to: | TUX | Tuxford | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/05/1946 | 5001 | Transfer in from: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/05/1946 | 6188 | Transfer in from: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/05/1946 | 6264 | Transfer in from: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/05/1946 | 6500 | Transfer in from: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/05/1946 | 3796 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/05/1946 | 6213 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/05/1946 | 6356 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/05/1946 | 6636 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 26/05/1946 | 5405 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 26/05/1946 | 3872 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-8-0T | on | 24/09/1946 | 9930 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-8-0T | on | 24/09/1946 | 9932 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-8-0T | on | 26/09/1946 | 9934 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-8-0T | on | 26/09/1946 | 9935 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-8-0T | on | 28/09/1946 | 9936 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-8-0T | on | 28/09/1946 | 9937 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 09/02/1947 | 3934 | Transfer in from: | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 09/02/1947 | 3937 | Transfer in from: | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 09/02/1947 | 3939 | Transfer in from: | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 09/02/1947 | 3941 | Transfer in from: | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | on | 16/02/1947 | 9058 | Transfer in from: | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | on | 09/03/1947 | 9057 | Transfer in from: | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | O3 | 2-8-0 | on | 10/05/1947 | 3492 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O3 | 2-8-0 | on | 19/06/1947 | 3490 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/10/1947 | 3922 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/10/1947 | 3944 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/10/1947 | 3963 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/10/1947 | 3975 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8962 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8964 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8968 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8970 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8971 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8973 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | O3 | 2-8-0 | on | 17/01/1948 | 3475 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O3 | 2-8-0 | on | 17/01/1948 | 3477 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/01/1948 | 3572 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/01/1948 | 3587 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/01/1948 | 3594 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/01/1948 | 3601 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/01/1948 | 3617 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/01/1948 | 3643 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/01/1948 | 3659 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/01/1948 | 3660 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/01/1948 | 3668 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/01/1948 | 3671 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/01/1948 | 3684 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/01/1948 | 3728 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/01/1948 | 3731 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/01/1948 | 3745 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/01/1948 | 3832 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/01/1948 | 3847 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/01/1948 | 3911 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O3 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/01/1948 | 3476 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O3 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/01/1948 | 3478 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O3 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/01/1948 | 3479 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O3 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/01/1948 | 3480 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O3 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/01/1948 | 3481 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O3 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/01/1948 | 3482 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O3 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/01/1948 | 3483 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O3 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/01/1948 | 3484 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O3 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/01/1948 | 3485 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O3 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/01/1948 | 3486 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O3 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/01/1948 | 3488 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O3 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/01/1948 | 3491 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O3 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/01/1948 | 3493 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O3 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/01/1948 | 63489 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O3 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/01/1948 | 63494 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 24/01/1948 | 3572 | Transfer in from: | FRO | Frodingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 24/01/1948 | 3587 | Transfer in from: | FRO | Frodingham | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 24/01/1948 | 3594 | Transfer in from: | FRO | Frodingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 24/01/1948 | 3601 | Transfer in from: | FRO | Frodingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 24/01/1948 | 3617 | Transfer in from: | FRO | Frodingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 24/01/1948 | 3643 | Transfer in from: | FRO | Frodingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 24/01/1948 | 3659 | Transfer in from: | FRO | Frodingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 24/01/1948 | 3660 | Transfer in from: | FRO | Frodingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 24/01/1948 | 3668 | Transfer in from: | FRO | Frodingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 24/01/1948 | 3671 | Transfer in from: | FRO | Frodingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 24/01/1948 | 3684 | Transfer in from: | FRO | Frodingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 24/01/1948 | 3728 | Transfer in from: | FRO | Frodingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 24/01/1948 | 3731 | Transfer in from: | FRO | Frodingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 24/01/1948 | 3745 | Transfer in from: | FRO | Frodingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 24/01/1948 | 3832 | Transfer in from: | FRO | Frodingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 24/01/1948 | 3847 | Transfer in from: | FRO | Frodingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 24/01/1948 | 3911 | Transfer in from: | FRO | Frodingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 24/01/1948 | 3572 | Transfer out to: | FRO | Frodingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 24/01/1948 | 3587 | Transfer out to: | FRO | Frodingham | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 24/01/1948 | 3594 | Transfer out to: | FRO | Frodingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 24/01/1948 | 3601 | Transfer out to: | FRO | Frodingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 24/01/1948 | 3617 | Transfer out to: | FRO | Frodingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 24/01/1948 | 3643 | Transfer out to: | FRO | Frodingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 24/01/1948 | 3659 | Transfer out to: | FRO | Frodingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 24/01/1948 | 3660 | Transfer out to: | FRO | Frodingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 24/01/1948 | 3668 | Transfer out to: | FRO | Frodingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 24/01/1948 | 3671 | Transfer out to: | FRO | Frodingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 24/01/1948 | 3684 | Transfer out to: | FRO | Frodingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 24/01/1948 | 3728 | Transfer out to: | FRO | Frodingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 24/01/1948 | 3731 | Transfer out to: | FRO | Frodingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 24/01/1948 | 3745 | Transfer out to: | FRO | Frodingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 24/01/1948 | 3832 | Transfer out to: | FRO | Frodingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 24/01/1948 | 3847 | Transfer out to: | FRO | Frodingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 24/01/1948 | 3911 | Transfer out to: | FRO | Frodingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 02/02/1948 | 3668 | Transfer out to: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | on | 22/02/1948 | 9051 | Transfer in from: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | on | 22/02/1948 | 9066 | Transfer in from: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 22/02/1948 | 3594 | Transfer out to: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 28/02/1948 | 9051 | Transfer in from: | FRO | Frodingham | ||
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 28/02/1948 | 9066 | Transfer in from: | FRO | Frodingham | ||
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 28/02/1948 | 9051 | Transfer out to: | FRO | Frodingham | ||
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 28/02/1948 | 9066 | Transfer out to: | FRO | Frodingham | ||
Steam | J66 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 17/04/1948 | 8376 | Transfer in from: | LIN | Lincoln | ||
Steam | J66 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 20/11/1948 | 8376 | Transfer out to: | LIN | Lincoln | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 29/01/1949 | 68618 | Transfer in from: | LIN | Lincoln | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 05/03/1949 | 8979 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 06/08/1949 | 68618 | Transfer out to: | LIN | Lincoln | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/08/1949 | 3576 | Transfer in from: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 13/08/1949 | 3576 | Transfer in from: | FRO | Frodingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 13/08/1949 | 3576 | Transfer out to: | FRO | Frodingham | ||
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | on | 29/08/1949 | 69058 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | on | 10/10/1949 | 69057 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 10/12/1949 | 63917 | Transfer in from: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/12/1949 | 63802 | Transfer out to: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 24/12/1949 | 63917 | Transfer in from: | FRO | Frodingham | ||
Steam | S1 | 0-8-4T | w/e | 24/12/1949 | 9902 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | S1 | 0-8-4T | w/e | 24/12/1949 | 9903 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 24/12/1949 | 63917 | Transfer out to: | FRO | Frodingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 25/12/1949 | 3906 | Transfer in from: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 25/12/1949 | 63747 | Transfer in from: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 31/12/1949 | 3906 | Transfer in from: | FRO | Frodingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 31/12/1949 | 63747 | Transfer in from: | FRO | Frodingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 31/12/1949 | 3906 | Transfer out to: | FRO | Frodingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 31/12/1949 | 63747 | Transfer out to: | FRO | Frodingham | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/03/1950 | 63941 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/03/1950 | 63975 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 26/03/1950 | 63653 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 26/03/1950 | 63718 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 01/04/1950 | 63653 | Transfer in from: | 36C | Frodingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 01/04/1950 | 63718 | Transfer in from: | 36C | Frodingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 01/04/1950 | 63653 | Transfer out to: | 36C | Frodingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 01/04/1950 | 63718 | Transfer out to: | 36C | Frodingham | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-8-0T | on | 16/04/1950 | 69930 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | on | 17/04/1950 | 69066 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Q1 | 0-8-0T | on | 27/08/1950 | 69930 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 10/09/1950 | 63741 | Transfer in from: | 40E | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 10/09/1950 | 63643 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 16/10/1950 | 8974 | Transfer in from: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 16/10/1950 | 8979 | Transfer out to: | 36B | Mexborough | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 21/10/1950 | 8974 | Transfer in from: | 36C | Frodingham | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 21/10/1950 | 8974 | Transfer out to: | 36C | Frodingham | ||
Steam | S1 | 0-8-4T | 4w/e | 23/12/1950 | 9903 | Transfer out to: | 36B | Mexborough | ||
Steam | S1 | 0-8-4T | 4w/e | 20/01/1951 | 69902 | Transfer out to: | 36B | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/03/1951 | 63587 | Transfer out to: | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/03/1951 | 63602 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/03/1951 | 63684 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/03/1951 | 63847 | Transfer out to: | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 24/03/1951 | 90013 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 24/03/1951 | 90032 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 24/03/1951 | 90070 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 24/03/1951 | 90111 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 24/03/1951 | 90422 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 24/03/1951 | 90425 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 24/03/1951 | 90540 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 31/03/1951 | 90013 | Transfer in from: | 36C | Frodingham | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 31/03/1951 | 90032 | Transfer in from: | 36C | Frodingham | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 31/03/1951 | 90070 | Transfer in from: | 36C | Frodingham | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 31/03/1951 | 90111 | Transfer in from: | 36C | Frodingham | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 31/03/1951 | 90422 | Transfer in from: | 36C | Frodingham | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 31/03/1951 | 90425 | Transfer in from: | 36C | Frodingham | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 31/03/1951 | 90540 | Transfer in from: | 36C | Frodingham | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 31/03/1951 | 90013 | Transfer out to: | 36C | Frodingham | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 31/03/1951 | 90032 | Transfer out to: | 36C | Frodingham | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 31/03/1951 | 90070 | Transfer out to: | 36C | Frodingham | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 31/03/1951 | 90111 | Transfer out to: | 36C | Frodingham | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 31/03/1951 | 90422 | Transfer out to: | 36C | Frodingham | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 31/03/1951 | 90425 | Transfer out to: | 36C | Frodingham | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 31/03/1951 | 90540 | Transfer out to: | 36C | Frodingham | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-8-0T | on | 08/04/1951 | 69926 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-8-0T | w/e | 14/04/1951 | 69926 | Transfer in from: | 36C | Frodingham | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-8-0T | w/e | 14/04/1951 | 69926 | Transfer out to: | 36C | Frodingham | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 05/05/1951 | 68960 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | on | 14/05/1951 | 69051 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 68960 | Transfer in from: | 36C | Frodingham | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 90646 | Transfer in from: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 68960 | Transfer out to: | 36C | Frodingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/05/1951 | 63601 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/05/1951 | 63649 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/05/1951 | 63832 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 26/05/1951 | 90133 | Transfer in from: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 26/05/1951 | 90456 | Transfer in from: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 23/06/1951 | 90133 | Transfer in from: | 36C | Frodingham | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 23/06/1951 | 90456 | Transfer in from: | 36C | Frodingham | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 23/06/1951 | 90133 | Transfer out to: | 36C | Frodingham | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 23/06/1951 | 90456 | Transfer out to: | 36C | Frodingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 01/07/1951 | 63584 | Transfer out to: | 39B | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 01/07/1951 | 63640 | Transfer out to: | 39B | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 01/07/1951 | 63645 | Transfer out to: | 39B | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 90031 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 90490 | Transfer in from: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 90647 | Transfer in from: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 21/07/1951 | 90031 | Transfer in from: | 36C | Frodingham | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 21/07/1951 | 90490 | Transfer in from: | 36C | Frodingham | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 21/07/1951 | 90647 | Transfer in from: | 36C | Frodingham | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 21/07/1951 | 90031 | Transfer out to: | 36C | Frodingham | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 21/07/1951 | 90490 | Transfer out to: | 36C | Frodingham | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 21/07/1951 | 90647 | Transfer out to: | 36C | Frodingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 22/02/1952 | 042 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 02/03/1952 | 63669 | Transfer out to: | 36D | Barnsley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 02/03/1952 | 63824 | Transfer out to: | 36D | Barnsley | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 90059 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 90714 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 17/08/1952 | 63983 | Transfer in from: | 36B | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 17/08/1952 | 63984 | Transfer in from: | 36B | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 17/08/1952 | 63985 | Transfer in from: | 36B | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 17/08/1952 | 63718 | Transfer out to: | 36D | Barnsley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 17/08/1952 | 63726 | Transfer out to: | 36D | Barnsley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 17/08/1952 | 63731 | Transfer out to: | 36D | Barnsley | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 23/08/1952 | 64309 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 63983 | Transfer in from: | 36C | Frodingham | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 63984 | Transfer in from: | 36C | Frodingham | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 63985 | Transfer in from: | 36C | Frodingham | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 63983 | Transfer out to: | 36C | Frodingham | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 63984 | Transfer out to: | 36C | Frodingham | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 63985 | Transfer out to: | 36C | Frodingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 22/09/1952 | 63920 | Transfer out to: | 37A | Ardsley | ||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 68793 | Transfer in from: | HSY | Hornsey | ||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 68815 | Transfer in from: | HSY | Hornsey | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 68968 | Transfer out to: | 34B | Hornsey | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 68971 | Transfer out to: | 34B | Hornsey | ||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 15/11/1952 | 68793 | Transfer in from: | 36C | Frodingham | ||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 15/11/1952 | 68815 | Transfer in from: | 36C | Frodingham | ||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 15/11/1952 | 68793 | Transfer out to: | 36C | Frodingham | ||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 15/11/1952 | 68815 | Transfer out to: | 36C | Frodingham | ||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 13/12/1952 | 68798 | Transfer in from: | 35B | Grantham | ||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 13/12/1952 | 68815 | Transfer out to: | 35B | Grantham | ||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 68798 | Transfer in from: | 36C | Frodingham | ||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 68798 | Transfer out to: | 36C | Frodingham | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/04/1953 | 63945 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/04/1953 | 63961 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/06/1953 | 63745 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 20/06/1953 | 68980 | Transfer in from: | 36B | Mexborough | ||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 20/06/1953 | 68798 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | on | 21/06/1953 | 69060 | Transfer in from: | 34A | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | on | 21/06/1953 | 69064 | Transfer in from: | 34A | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | on | 21/06/1953 | 69065 | Transfer in from: | 34A | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 25/07/1953 | 90232 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 25/07/1953 | 90596 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 25/07/1953 | 68793 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 25/07/1953 | 68973 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 25/07/1953 | 68974 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 19/09/1953 | 90512 | Transfer in from: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/10/1953 | 63937 | Transfer out to: | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 03/01/1954 | 63945 | Transfer out to: | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 03/01/1954 | 63961 | Transfer out to: | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | ||
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | on | 10/05/1954 | 69065 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | on | 07/06/1954 | 69060 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 13/06/1954 | 63662 | Transfer in from: | 39A | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 13/06/1954 | 63761 | Transfer in from: | 39A | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 13/06/1954 | 63799 | Transfer in from: | 39A | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 13/06/1954 | 63853 | Transfer in from: | 39A | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 13/06/1954 | 63880 | Transfer in from: | 39A | Gorton | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 13/06/1954 | 63922 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 13/06/1954 | 63934 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 13/06/1954 | 63944 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 13/06/1954 | 63963 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 13/06/1954 | 63983 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 13/06/1954 | 63985 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/07/1954 | 63601 | Transfer in from: | 39A | Gorton | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | 5w/e | 24/07/1954 | 68973 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 22/08/1954 | 63807 | Transfer in from: | 39A | Gorton | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 29/08/1954 | 63939 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 29/08/1954 | 63984 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 13/11/1954 | 64319 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 13/11/1954 | 64410 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | on | 24/01/1955 | 69064 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 30/01/1955 | 63655 | Transfer out to: | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 19/02/1955 | 90601 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | S1 | 0-8-4T | 5w/e | 23/04/1955 | 69901 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | S1 | 0-8-4T | 5w/e | 23/04/1955 | 69905 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 3w/e | 12/11/1955 | 90597 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 3w/e | 12/11/1955 | 90598 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 13/11/1955 | 63659 | Transfer out to: | 36D | Barnsley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 13/11/1955 | 63911 | Transfer out to: | 36D | Barnsley | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 25/05/1956 | 68980 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-8-0T | on | 05/11/1956 | 69937 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 15/12/1956 | 68965 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | on | 29/12/1956 | 64410 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | S1 | 0-8-4T | on | 01/01/1957 | 69901 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | S1 | 0-8-4T | on | 01/01/1957 | 69905 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | 5w/e | 19/01/1957 | 68963 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | 5w/e | 19/01/1957 | 68977 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 13/04/1957 | 90596 | Transfer out to: | 65D | Dawsholm | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/01/1958 | 64315 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/01/1958 | 64365 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/01/1958 | 64430 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Q1 | 0-8-0T | on | 03/02/1958 | 69926 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/02/1958 | 64351 | Transfer in from: | LIN | Lincoln | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/02/1958 | 64430 | Transfer out to: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/02/1958 | 63654 | Transfer in from: | RET | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-8-0T | on | 15/06/1958 | 69928 | Transfer in from: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-8-0T | on | 15/06/1958 | 69929 | Transfer in from: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 06/07/1958 | 63818 | Transfer out to: | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 19/07/1958 | 90469 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 19/07/1958 | 68960 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 19/07/1958 | 68970 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-8-0T | on | 02/10/1958 | 69930 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Q1 | 0-8-0T | on | 12/11/1958 | 69932 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | on | 24/11/1958 | D3638 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | on | 25/11/1958 | D3639 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | on | 28/11/1958 | D3640 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | on | 05/12/1958 | D3641 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | on | 05/12/1958 | D3642 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | on | 12/12/1958 | D3643 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | on | 12/12/1958 | D3644 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | on | 16/12/1958 | D3645 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | on | 19/12/1958 | D3646 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 21/12/1958 | 63781 | Transfer in from: | 36B | Mexborough | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | on | 23/12/1958 | D3647 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | on | 07/01/1959 | D3648 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | on | 09/01/1959 | D3649 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 10/01/1959 | 92034 | Transfer in from: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 10/01/1959 | 92035 | Transfer in from: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 10/01/1959 | 92184 | Transfer in from: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 10/01/1959 | 92189 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 10/01/1959 | 92190 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/01/1959 | 63853 | Transfer out to: | 41J | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 31/01/1959 | 68962 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 31/01/1959 | 68964 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 31/01/1959 | 68965 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 31/01/1959 | 68973 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 07/02/1959 | 92197 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 07/02/1959 | 92199 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 11/04/1959 | D3649 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 24/04/1959 | 63696 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 25/04/1959 | 92034 | Transfer out to: | 34E | New England | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 25/04/1959 | 92035 | Transfer out to: | 34E | New England | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 25/04/1959 | 92189 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 02/05/1959 | 92190 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 02/05/1959 | 92197 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 09/05/1959 | 68963 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 09/05/1959 | 68977 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/06/1959 | 63761 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 92184 | Transfer out to: | 34E | New England | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 21/06/1959 | 63602 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 21/06/1959 | 63647 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 22/06/1959 | 63654 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 01/08/1959 | 64385 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 01/08/1959 | 64421 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 01/08/1959 | 64315 | Transfer out to: | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 06/08/1959 | 63665 | Transfer in from: | 41J | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | on | 17/08/1959 | 64319 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | on | 17/08/1959 | 64365 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Q1 | 0-8-0T | on | 20/08/1959 | 69928 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Q1 | 0-8-0T | on | 20/08/1959 | 69934 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Q1 | 0-8-0T | on | 28/08/1959 | 69929 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/08/1959 | 64371 | Transfer in from: | 41J | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/08/1959 | 64404 | Transfer in from: | 36D | Barnsley | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-8-0T | on | 03/09/1959 | 69935 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 13/09/1959 | 63748 | Transfer in from: | 39B | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 14/09/1959 | 63660 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Q1 | 0-8-0T | on | 15/09/1959 | 69936 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 25/10/1959 | 63836 | Transfer in from: | 36D | Barnsley | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/10/1959 | 64351 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/11/1959 | 63572 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/11/1959 | 63642 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 22/11/1959 | 63824 | Transfer in from: | 36D | Barnsley | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 28/11/1959 | 64395 | Transfer in from: | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 28/11/1959 | 64423 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | on | 11/12/1959 | 64421 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 12/12/1959 | D3648 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 27/12/1959 | 63666 | Transfer in from: | 36B | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 27/12/1959 | 63730 | Transfer in from: | 36B | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 27/12/1959 | 63764 | Transfer in from: | 36B | Mexborough | ||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | on | 03/01/1960 | 62018 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | on | 10/01/1960 | 62020 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | on | 17/01/1960 | 62032 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | on | 24/01/1960 | 62013 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | on | 31/01/1960 | 62014 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 31/01/1960 | 63602 | Transfer out to: | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 31/01/1960 | 63647 | Transfer out to: | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 31/01/1960 | 63665 | Transfer out to: | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 31/01/1960 | 63824 | Transfer out to: | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 90007 | Transfer in from: | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 90087 | Transfer in from: | 41H | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 90550 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 90696 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 90732 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 20/02/1960 | 90189 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 15/10/1960 | 90053 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 15/10/1960 | 90161 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 15/10/1960 | 90166 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 15/10/1960 | 90288 | Transfer in from: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 15/10/1960 | 90648 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 15/10/1960 | 64395 | Transfer out to: | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 22/10/1960 | 90025 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 22/10/1960 | 90115 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 22/10/1960 | 90120 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 05/11/1960 | 90108 | Transfer in from: | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/11/1960 | 63730 | Transfer out to: | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/11/1960 | 63764 | Transfer out to: | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 26/11/1960 | 90537 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 26/11/1960 | 90602 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | on | 11/12/1960 | 62016 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | on | 11/12/1960 | 62017 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | on | 18/12/1960 | 62033 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | on | 18/12/1960 | 62035 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/01/1961 | 64371 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | on | 06/02/1961 | 64404 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 21/04/1961 | 63595 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/05/1961 | 63662 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/05/1961 | 63747 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 22/06/1961 | 63626 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | on | 05/10/1961 | 64385 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 05/11/1961 | 63593 | Transfer in from: | 36B | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 05/11/1961 | 63802 | Transfer in from: | 41F | Mexborough | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 11/11/1961 | 90031 | Transfer out to: | 34E | New England | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 11/11/1961 | 90490 | Transfer out to: | 34E | New England | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/11/1961 | 63593 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/11/1961 | 63802 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 18/11/1961 | 90079 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 18/11/1961 | 90453 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 24/11/1961 | 63799 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 03/12/1961 | 63628 | Transfer in from: | 36B | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 03/12/1961 | 63832 | Transfer in from: | 36B | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 03/12/1961 | 63884 | Transfer in from: | 41F | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 03/12/1961 | 63897 | Transfer in from: | 36B | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 10/12/1961 | 63791 | Transfer in from: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 10/12/1961 | 63898 | Transfer in from: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/03/1962 | 64423 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 05/06/1962 | 63917 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 25/08/1962 | 90119 | Transfer in from: | 41F | Mexborough | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 30/08/1962 | 90648 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 16/09/1962 | 63586 | Transfer in from: | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 16/09/1962 | 63613 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 16/09/1962 | 63693 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 16/09/1962 | 90288 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 16/09/1962 | 90512 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 16/09/1962 | 90550 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 16/09/1962 | 90732 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/09/1962 | D3648 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 29/09/1962 | 90000 | Transfer in from: | 34E | New England | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 29/09/1962 | 90024 | Transfer in from: | 34E | New England | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 29/09/1962 | 90165 | Transfer in from: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 29/09/1962 | 90239 | Transfer in from: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 29/09/1962 | 90665 | Transfer in from: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 29/09/1962 | 90730 | Transfer in from: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 14/10/1962 | 63802 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 14/10/1962 | 63613 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 25/10/1962 | 90087 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | on | 04/11/1962 | 62014 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 19/11/1962 | 63693 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 19/11/1962 | 63748 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 02/12/1962 | 90544 | Transfer in from: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 02/12/1962 | 90573 | Transfer in from: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 09/12/1962 | 63690 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/12/1962 | 63617 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 15/12/1962 | 63666 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 29/12/1962 | 63832 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 29/12/1962 | 90425 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 26/01/1963 | 90165 | Transfer out to: | 41F | Mexborough | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 26/01/1963 | 90544 | Transfer out to: | 41F | Mexborough | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 26/01/1963 | 90573 | Transfer out to: | 41F | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 17/03/1963 | 63880 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 13/04/1963 | 90439 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 13/04/1963 | 90613 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 02/05/1963 | 63898 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 22/05/1963 | 63897 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 16/06/1963 | 63601 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 08/07/1963 | 90597 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | on | 13/07/1963 | 62016 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 19/07/1963 | 63744 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 29/07/1963 | 90696 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | on | 07/09/1963 | 62032 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 92199 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 04/10/1963 | 90453 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | on | 29/10/1963 | 62013 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 25/11/1963 | 90239 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 29/11/1963 | 63576 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 30/11/1963 | 92192 | Transfer in from: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 30/11/1963 | 92198 | Transfer in from: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 30/11/1963 | 92199 | Transfer in from: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 11/01/1964 | 90189 | Transfer out to: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 11/01/1964 | 90730 | Transfer out to: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 17/01/1964 | 90079 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/02/1964 | 90161 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 25/02/1964 | 90598 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | on | 13/03/1964 | 62018 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 06/04/1964 | 90111 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 29/04/1964 | 63836 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 05/05/1964 | 90646 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 09/06/1964 | 63884 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/06/1964 | 63802 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | on | 02/08/1964 | 92198 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | on | 02/08/1964 | 92199 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/09/1964 | 90283 | Transfer in from: | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/09/1964 | 90315 | Transfer in from: | 9J | Agecroft | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 25/09/1964 | 63807 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 08/11/1964 | 90469 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | D3647 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | D3648 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 13/12/1964 | 90714 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/12/1964 | 63728 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 03/01/1965 | 63906 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | on | 10/01/1965 | 62014 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | on | 10/01/1965 | 62015 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | on | 10/01/1965 | 62067 | Transfer in from: | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | ||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | on | 10/01/1965 | 62020 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | on | 10/01/1965 | 62033 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 10/01/1965 | 90602 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 17/01/1965 | 90119 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 21/02/1965 | 90070 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 21/02/1965 | 92192 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 07/03/1965 | 90647 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 04/04/1965 | 63741 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 04/04/1965 | 90059 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 04/04/1965 | 90120 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 17/04/1965 | 90248 | Transfer in from: | 8L | Aintree | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 17/04/1965 | 90274 | Transfer in from: | 8L | Aintree | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 17/04/1965 | 90381 | Transfer in from: | 27B | Aintree | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 17/04/1965 | 90493 | Transfer in from: | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 17/04/1965 | 90516 | Transfer in from: | 8L | Aintree | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 09/05/1965 | 61195 | Transfer in from: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 09/05/1965 | 61370 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 09/05/1965 | 61389 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 09/05/1965 | 63793 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 09/05/1965 | 90115 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 09/05/1965 | 90166 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 29/05/1965 | 90178 | Transfer in from: | 8G | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 29/05/1965 | 90183 | Transfer in from: | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 29/05/1965 | 90212 | Transfer in from: | 8G | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 29/05/1965 | 90390 | Transfer in from: | 8G | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 29/05/1965 | 90702 | Transfer in from: | 8G | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 30/05/1965 | 90613 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | on | 06/06/1965 | 62014 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 06/06/1965 | 90000 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 06/06/1965 | 90422 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 06/06/1965 | 90601 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 13/06/1965 | 63651 | Transfer in from: | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 13/06/1965 | 63661 | Transfer in from: | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 13/06/1965 | 63606 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 13/06/1965 | 63671 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 90223 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 90280 | Transfer in from: | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 90501 | Transfer in from: | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 90551 | Transfer in from: | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 90669 | Transfer in from: | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 90689 | Transfer in from: | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 04/07/1965 | 61370 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 04/07/1965 | 90053 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 04/07/1965 | 90540 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 11/07/1965 | 61127 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 11/07/1965 | 61348 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 11/07/1965 | 63651 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 11/07/1965 | 90007 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | on | 18/07/1965 | 62035 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 24/07/1965 | 90665 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 24/07/1965 | 90669 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 24/07/1965 | 90689 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | on | 25/07/1965 | 62015 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 01/08/1965 | 63781 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 01/08/1965 | 90025 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 01/08/1965 | 90108 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 01/08/1965 | 90702 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 08/08/1965 | 63661 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 15/08/1965 | 61127 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 15/08/1965 | 90212 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 29/08/1965 | 90183 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 05/09/1965 | 63628 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 05/09/1965 | 63791 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 05/09/1965 | 90280 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 11/09/1965 | 90035 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 11/09/1965 | 90075 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 19/09/1965 | 63653 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 19/09/1965 | 90390 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 25/09/1965 | 90498 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 03/10/1965 | 63586 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 03/10/1965 | 90283 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | on | 10/10/1965 | 62017 | Transfer out to: | 52F | Blyth (North) | ||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | on | 10/10/1965 | 62067 | Transfer out to: | 52F | Blyth (North) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 10/10/1965 | 63788 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 17/10/1965 | 90133 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 24/10/1965 | 90381 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 06/11/1965 | 90501 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 06/11/1965 | 90516 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 06/11/1965 | 90537 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 06/11/1965 | 90551 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 07/11/1965 | 90248 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 07/11/1965 | 90439 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 13/11/1965 | 90410 | Transfer in from: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 13/11/1965 | 90471 | Transfer in from: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 14/11/1965 | 61348 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 14/11/1965 | 61195 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 14/11/1965 | 61389 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 21/11/1965 | 90315 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 25/12/1965 | 90367 | Transfer in from: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 01/01/1966 | 90080 | Transfer in from: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 01/01/1966 | 90148 | Transfer in from: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 01/01/1966 | 90241 | Transfer in from: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 01/01/1966 | 90384 | Transfer in from: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 01/01/1966 | 90514 | Transfer in from: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 02/01/1966 | 90232 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 02/01/1966 | 90274 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 09/01/1966 | 90241 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 23/01/1966 | 90514 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 27/02/1966 | 90024 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 27/02/1966 | 90032 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 27/02/1966 | 90035 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 27/02/1966 | 90080 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 27/02/1966 | 90178 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 27/02/1966 | 90367 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 27/02/1966 | 90384 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 27/02/1966 | 90456 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 27/02/1966 | 90493 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 27/02/1966 | 90498 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 05/03/1966 | 90013 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 05/03/1966 | 90075 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 05/03/1966 | 90148 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 05/03/1966 | 90410 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 05/03/1966 | 90471 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 12/08/1967 | D3638 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 06/07/1968 | D3639 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 05/10/1968 | D3280 | Transfer in from: | 66C | Hamilton (West) | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | on | 06/10/1968 | D3643 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 30/11/1968 | D3252 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | on | 03/12/1968 | D3640 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 26/01/1969 | D3281 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | on | 15/03/1969 | D3645 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/03/1969 | D3549 | Transfer in from: | 62A | Thornton Junction | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 12/04/1969 | D3549 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | on | 28/06/1969 | D3642 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1969 | D4062 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | on | 15/06/1970 | D3644 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 27/06/1970 | D3299 | Transfer in from: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 20/02/1971 | D3663 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 20/02/1971 | D3646 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | on | 05/12/1971 | D3641 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 11/12/1971 | D3080 | Transfer in from: | 50C | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 08/01/1972 | D3519 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 08/01/1972 | D4062 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 15/01/1972 | D3512 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 15/01/1972 | D3080 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 19/02/1972 | D3507 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 19/02/1972 | D3252 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 06/05/1972 | D3206 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 29/12/1973 | 08207 | Transfer in from: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 09/03/1974 | 08099 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 09/03/1974 | 08207 | Transfer out to: | SF | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 09/11/1974 | 08391 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/06/1975 | 08099 | Transfer out to: | BG | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 23/05/1976 | 08093 | Transfer in from: | BG | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 23/05/1976 | 08138 | Transfer out to: | NR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 20/11/1976 | 08211 | Transfer out to: | TE | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 04/12/1977 | 08229 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 31/12/1977 | 08508 | Transfer out to: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 27/07/1978 | 08404 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 26/07/1981 | 08093 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/12/1984 | 08392 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 04/08/1985 | 08391 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 26/09/1988 | 08210 | Condemned |