Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 190 Today
» 1091 Yesterday
» 190 Week
» 18972 Month
» 267265 Year
» 1151646 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Grantham


Type Class Wheels Period Date Number Event Code Depot Length of Stay Notes
Steam C1 4-4-2 m/e 05/1904 275 1st Allocation        
Steam C1 4-4-2 m/e 06/1904 281 1st Allocation        
Steam C1 4-4-2 m/e 06/1904 282 1st Allocation        
Steam C1 4-4-2 m/e 06/1904 283 1st Allocation        
Steam C1 4-4-2 m/e 06/1904 285 1st Allocation        
Steam C1 4-4-2 m/e 06/1904 286 1st Allocation        
Steam C1 4-4-2 m/e 07/1904 284 1st Allocation        
Steam C1 4-4-2 m/e 07/1904 287 1st Allocation        
Steam C1 4-4-2 m/e 05/1905 293 1st Allocation        
Steam C1 4-4-2 m/e 05/1905 294 1st Allocation        
Steam C1 4-4-2 m/e 05/1905 296 1st Allocation        
Steam C1 4-4-2 m/e 05/1905 297 1st Allocation        
Steam C1 4-4-2 m/e 06/1905 1401 1st Allocation        
Steam C1 4-4-2 m/e 06/1905 1402 1st Allocation        
Steam C1 4-4-2 m/e 06/1905 1403 1st Allocation        
Steam C1 4-4-2 m/e 06/1905 1404 1st Allocation        
Steam C1 4-4-2 m/e 06/1905 1405 1st Allocation        
Steam C1 4-4-2 m/e 06/1905 1406 1st Allocation        
Steam C1 4-4-2 m/e 03/1906 1414 1st Allocation        
Steam C1 4-4-2 m/e 04/1906 1415 1st Allocation        
Steam C1 4-4-2 m/e 04/1906 1416 1st Allocation        
Steam C1 4-4-2 m/e 04/1906 1417 1st Allocation        
Steam C1 4-4-2 m/e 05/1906 1418 1st Allocation        
Steam C1 4-4-2 m/e 06/1907 1430 1st Allocation        
Steam C1 4-4-2 m/e 06/1907 1431 1st Allocation        
Steam C1 4-4-2 m/e 11/1907 1432 1st Allocation        
Steam C1 4-4-2 m/e 11/1907 1433 1st Allocation        
Steam C1 4-4-2 m/e 05/1908 1446 1st Allocation        
Steam C1 4-4-2 m/e 06/1908 1447 1st Allocation        
Steam C1 4-4-2 m/e 09/1910 1457 1st Allocation        
Steam C1 4-4-2 10/03/1923 300 Transfer in from: DON Doncaster    
Steam C1 4-4-2 10/03/1923 1447 Transfer out to: DON Doncaster    
Steam C1 4-4-2 06/05/1923 1428 Transfer in from: KX Kings Cross    
Steam A1 4-6-2 26/05/1923 1476 1st Allocation        
Steam C1 4-4-2 23/06/1923 1438 Transfer in from: NWE New England    
Steam C1 4-4-2 23/06/1923 1439 Transfer in from: NWE New England    
Steam C1 4-4-2 29/06/1923 1433 Transfer out to: SHF Sheffield Neepsend    
Steam A1 4-6-2 25/07/1923 1479 1st Allocation        
Steam A1 4-6-2 17/08/1923 1480 1st Allocation        
Steam C1 4-4-2 23/12/1923 1428 Transfer out to: SHF Sheffield Neepsend    
Steam C1 4-4-2 03/02/1924 1402 Transfer out to: DON Doncaster    
Steam C1 4-4-2 03/02/1924 1416 Transfer out to: DON Doncaster    
Steam C1 4-4-2 17/02/1924 251 Transfer in from: DON Doncaster    
Steam C1 4-4-2 24/02/1924 1418 Transfer out to: DON Doncaster    
Steam C1 4-4-2 02/03/1924 1448 Transfer in from: DON Doncaster    
Steam C1 4-4-2 09/03/1924 273 Transfer in from: DON Doncaster    
Steam C1 4-4-2 11/05/1924 3284 Transfer out to: KX Kings Cross    
Steam C1 4-4-2 25/05/1924 3300 Transfer out to: KX Kings Cross    
Steam C1 4-4-2 08/06/1924 3294 Transfer out to: NWE New England    
Steam C1 4-4-2 08/06/1924 4406 Transfer out to: NWE New England    
Steam C1 4-4-2 15/06/1924 3282 Transfer out to: NWE New England    
Steam A1 4-6-2 28/06/1924 2543 1st Allocation        
Steam C1 4-4-2 03/08/1924 4404 Transfer out to: KX Kings Cross    
Steam A1 4-6-2 21/08/1924 2543 Transfer out to: DON Doncaster    
Steam A1 4-6-2 30/08/1924 2547 1st Allocation        
Steam A1 4-6-2 27/09/1924 2548 1st Allocation        
Steam A1 4-6-2 09/02/1925 2550 Transfer in from: GOR Gorton    
Steam A1 4-6-2 09/02/1925 2551 Transfer in from: GOR Gorton    
Steam A1 4-6-2 18/02/1925 2556 1st Allocation        
Steam C1 4-4-2 03/1925 4417 Transfer out to: NWE New England    
Steam A1 4-6-2 25/03/1925 2557 Transfer in from: GOR Gorton    
Steam A1 4-6-2 17/04/1925 2558 Transfer in from: GOR Gorton    
Steam C1 4-4-2 26/04/1925 273 Transfer out to: DON Doncaster    
Steam C1 4-4-2 27/05/1925 3287 Transfer out to: SHF Sheffield Neepsend    
Steam C1 4-4-2 11/06/1925 3293 Transfer out to: NWE New England    
Steam A1 4-6-2 09/04/1926 2561 Transfer in from: DON Doncaster    
Steam A1 4-6-2 11/03/1927 2547 Transfer out to: KX Kings Cross    
Steam A1 4-6-2 27/03/1927 2547 Transfer in from: KX Kings Cross    
Steam A1 4-6-2 27/03/1927 2561 Transfer out to: KX Kings Cross    
Steam A1 4-6-2 29/04/1927 2554 Transfer in from: DON Doncaster    
Steam C1 4-4-2 02/07/1927 3251 Transfer out to: KX Kings Cross    
Steam A1 4-6-2 16/07/1927 2549 Transfer in from: DON Doncaster    
Steam A1 4-6-2 16/07/1927 4480 Transfer out to: DON Doncaster    
Steam C1 4-4-2 10/03/1928 4419 Transfer in from: KX Kings Cross    
Steam C1 4-4-2 17/03/1928 3286 Transfer out to: KX Kings Cross    
Steam A1 4-6-2 11/04/1928 4476 Transfer out to: KX Kings Cross    
Steam A1 4-6-2 26/04/1928 2547 Transfer out to: KX Kings Cross    
Steam A1 4-6-2 01/06/1928 2546 Transfer in from: KX Kings Cross    
Steam A1 4-6-2 01/06/1928 2556 Transfer out to: KX Kings Cross    
Steam A1 4-6-2 07/06/1928 2545 Transfer in from: KX Kings Cross    
Steam A1 4-6-2 07/06/1928 2556 Transfer in from: KX Kings Cross    
Steam A1 4-6-2 07/06/1928 2546 Transfer out to: KX Kings Cross    
Steam C1 4-4-2 04/08/1928 4419 Transfer out to: KX Kings Cross    
Steam A1 4-6-2 16/09/1928 4478 Transfer in from: DON Doncaster    
Steam A1 4-6-2 14/10/1928 2562 Transfer in from: DON Doncaster    
Steam O4 2-8-0 07/11/1928 6634 Transfer in from: NWE New England    
Steam C1 4-4-2 22/11/1928 4430 Transfer out to: CAM Cambridge    
Steam A1 4-6-2 25/11/1928 2560 Transfer in from: KX Kings Cross    
Steam C1 4-4-2 16/03/1929 3297 Transfer out to: CAM Cambridge    
Steam A1 4-6-2 15/07/1929 2554 Transfer out to: KX Kings Cross    
Steam A1 4-6-2 05/10/1929 2555 Transfer in from: DON Doncaster    
Steam A1 4-6-2 06/10/1929 2554 Transfer in from: KX Kings Cross    
Steam A1 4-6-2 10/10/1929 2554 Transfer out to: DON Doncaster    
Steam A1 4-6-2 16/10/1929 2554 Transfer in from: DON Doncaster    
Steam A1 4-6-2 17/10/1929 2555 Transfer out to: DON Doncaster    
Steam A1 4-6-2 19/01/1930 2543 Transfer in from: DON Doncaster    
Steam C1 4-4-2 13/02/1930 4443 Transfer in from: NWE New England    
Steam C1 4-4-2 13/02/1930 4403 Transfer out to: NWE New England    
Steam A1 4-6-2 11/03/1930 2543 Transfer out to: KX Kings Cross    
Steam C1 4-4-2 24/03/1930 4403 Transfer in from: NWE New England    
Steam C1 4-4-2 24/03/1930 4443 Transfer out to: NWE New England    
Steam A1 4-6-2 05/07/1930 2548 Transfer out to: DON Doncaster    
Steam A1 4-6-2 17/08/1930 2548 Transfer in from: DON Doncaster    
Steam K1 2-6-0 09/10/1930 4639 Transfer in from: NWE New England    
Steam C1 4-4-2 27/10/1930 4403 Transfer out to: NWE New England    
Steam K1 2-6-0 30/12/1930 4630 Transfer in from: NWE New England    
Steam K1 2-6-0 31/12/1930 4639 Transfer out to: NWE New England    
Steam O4 2-8-0 19/01/1931 6604 Transfer in from: NWE New England    
Steam O4 2-8-0 19/01/1931 6634 Transfer out to: NWE New England    
Steam A1 4-6-2 17/02/1931 4481 Transfer in from: DON Doncaster    
Steam A1 4-6-2 21/02/1931 4481 Transfer out to: DON Doncaster    
Steam K1 2-6-0 14/06/1932 4639 Transfer in from: NWE New England    
Steam K1 2-6-0 09/11/1932 4630 Transfer out to: NWE New England    
Steam A1 4-6-2 12/12/1932 4471 Transfer in from: DON Doncaster    
Steam C1 4-4-2 20/12/1932 3296 Transfer out to: DON Doncaster    
Steam O4 2-8-0 06/02/1933 6535 Transfer in from: DON Doncaster    
Steam O4 2-8-0 21/02/1933 6264 Transfer in from: NWE New England    
Steam A1 4-6-2 05/05/1933 4471 Transfer out to: DON Doncaster    
Steam C1 4-4-2 09/05/1933 3296 Transfer in from: DON Doncaster    
Steam O4 2-8-0 20/05/1933 6264 Transfer out to: NWE New England    
Steam C1 4-4-2 19/07/1933 4439 Transfer out to: CAM Cambridge    
Steam C1 4-4-2 17/08/1933 4413 Transfer in from: NWE New England    
Steam C1 4-4-2 08/09/1933 4413 Transfer out to: NWE New England    
Steam A1 4-6-2 14/10/1933 2559 Transfer in from: DON Doncaster    
Steam O4 2-8-0 08/12/1933 6321 Transfer in from: NWE New England    
Steam O4 2-8-0 29/12/1933 6321 Transfer out to: NWE New England    
Steam A1 4-6-2 04/07/1934 2559 Transfer out to: DON Doncaster    
Steam A1 4-6-2 12/11/1934 4477 Transfer in from: DON Doncaster    
Steam A1 4-6-2 11/04/1935 4477 Transfer out to: DON Doncaster    
Steam O4 2-8-0 31/05/1935 6606 Transfer in from: NWE New England    
Steam O4 2-8-0 10/09/1935 6606 Transfer out to: CLK Colwick    
Steam O4 2-8-0 14/09/1935 6509 Transfer in from: NWE New England    
Steam O4 2-8-0 29/11/1935 6509 Transfer out to: NWE New England    
Steam A1 4-6-2 13/12/1935 2555 Transfer in from: DON Doncaster    
Steam K1 2-6-0 27/12/1935 4639 Transfer out to: NWE New England    
Steam O4 2-8-0 28/12/1935 6635 Transfer in from: CLK Colwick    
Steam A1 4-6-2 01/01/1936 2555 Transfer out to: NWE New England    
Steam A1 4-6-2 23/10/1936 2555 Transfer in from: NWE New England    
Steam A1 4-6-2 29/10/1936 2555 Transfer out to: COP Copley Hill (Leeds)    
Steam O4 2-8-0 02/05/1937 6627 Transfer in from: GOR Gorton    
Steam O4 2-8-0 04/05/1937 6628 Transfer in from: GOR Gorton    
Steam A1 4-6-2 09/03/1938 2559 Transfer in from: DON Doncaster    
Steam A4 4-6-2 26/04/1938 4494 Transfer in from: DON Doncaster    
Steam A1 4-6-2 26/04/1938 4478 Transfer out to: DON Doncaster    
Steam A4 4-6-2 30/04/1938 4466 Transfer in from: KX Kings Cross    
Steam A1 4-6-2 30/04/1938 2562 Transfer out to: KX Kings Cross    
Steam C1 4-4-2 28/05/1938 4431 Transfer out to: NWE New England    
Steam A4 4-6-2 09/1938 4900 Transfer in from: DON Doncaster    
Steam A1 4-6-2 15/09/1938 2556 Transfer out to: DON Doncaster    
Steam A1 4-6-2 19/09/1938 2558 Transfer out to: GOR Gorton    
Steam A4 4-6-2 22/09/1938 4900 Transfer out to: KX Kings Cross    
Steam C1 4-4-2 30/11/1938 3296 Transfer out to: NWE New England    
Steam C1 4-4-2 30/11/1938 4414 Transfer out to: NWE New England    
Steam C1 4-4-2 30/11/1938 4446 Transfer out to: NWE New England    
Steam V2 2-6-2 07/03/1939 4803 Transfer in from: KX Kings Cross    
Steam A1 4-6-2 09/03/1939 2559 Transfer out to: GHD Gateshead    
Steam A3 4-6-2 11/03/1939 2750 Transfer in from: DON Doncaster    
Steam A4 4-6-2 11/03/1939 4494 Transfer out to: DON Doncaster    
Steam C1 4-4-2 25/06/1939 4430 Transfer in from: CAM Cambridge    
Steam V2 2-6-2 14/08/1939 4841 Transfer in from: NWE New England    
Steam A1 4-6-2 18/08/1939 2554 Transfer out to: GOR Gorton    
Steam V2 2-6-2 01/09/1939 4842 1st Allocation        
Steam V2 2-6-2 11/09/1939 4842 Transfer out to: NWE New England    
Steam O4 2-8-0 27/09/1939 6244 Transfer in from: SHF Sheffield Neepsend    
Steam O4 2-8-0 27/09/1939 6533 Transfer in from: DON Doncaster    
Steam A4 4-6-2 03/12/1939 4495 Transfer in from: KX Kings Cross    
Steam A4 4-6-2 04/12/1939 4496 Transfer in from: KX Kings Cross    
Steam A1 4-6-2 18/03/1940 2553 Transfer in from: DON Doncaster    
Steam A1 4-6-2 18/03/1940 2555 Transfer in from: DON Doncaster    
Steam V2 2-6-2 18/03/1940 4803 Transfer out to: DON Doncaster    
Steam V2 2-6-2 18/03/1940 4841 Transfer out to: DON Doncaster    
Steam O4 2-8-0 20/04/1940 6509 Transfer in from: CLK Colwick    
Steam J39 0-6-0 12/07/1940 1286 Transfer in from: ARD Ardsley    
Steam J39 0-6-0 12/07/1940 2697 Transfer in from: ARD Ardsley    
Steam J39 0-6-0 14/07/1940 2987 Transfer in from: CLK Colwick    
Steam J39 0-6-0 22/08/1940 2970 Transfer in from: CLK Colwick    
Steam J39 0-6-0 06/09/1940 2970 Transfer out to: CLK Colwick    
Steam O4 2-8-0 16/09/1940 6324 Transfer in from: CLK Colwick    
Steam O4 2-8-0 16/09/1940 6377 Transfer in from: CLK Colwick    
Steam J39 0-6-0 23/10/1940 2987 Transfer out to: CLK Colwick    
Steam A4 4-6-2 24/01/1941 4494 Transfer in from: KX Kings Cross    
Steam A4 4-6-2 03/02/1941 4494 Transfer out to: KX Kings Cross    
Steam A3 4-6-2 09/02/1941 2743 Transfer in from: DON Doncaster    
Steam J39 0-6-0 25/03/1941 2697 Transfer out to: GOR Gorton    
Steam J39 0-6-0 26/03/1941 1286 Transfer out to: GOR Gorton    
Steam O4 2-8-0 07/05/1941 5001 Transfer in from: IMM Immingham    
Steam O4 2-8-0 07/05/1941 6512 Transfer in from: IMM Immingham    
Steam J39 0-6-0 11/05/1941 3089 Transfer in from: NWE New England    
Steam J39 0-6-0 11/05/1941 3090 Transfer in from: NWE New England    
Steam J39 0-6-0 13/05/1941 3091 1st Allocation        
Steam J39 0-6-0 05/06/1941 3093 1st Allocation        
Steam J39 0-6-0 18/06/1941 3094 1st Allocation        
Steam J39 0-6-0 22/07/1941 3094 Transfer out to: NWE New England    
Steam J39 0-6-0 26/07/1941 3093 Transfer out to: BOS Boston    
Steam O4 2-8-0 13/09/1941 704 Condemned      
Steam O4 2-8-0 19/09/1941 762 Condemned      
Steam J39 0-6-0 08/10/1941 3091 Transfer out to: CLK Colwick    
Steam J39 0-6-0 09/10/1941 3089 Transfer out to: CLK Colwick    
Steam J39 0-6-0 09/10/1941 3090 Transfer out to: CLK Colwick    
Steam C1 4-4-2 11/10/1941 3275 Transfer out to: CLK Colwick    
Steam O4 2-8-0 18/10/1941 786 Condemned      
Steam A3 4-6-2 09/12/1941 2504 Transfer in from: KX Kings Cross    
Steam A1 4-6-2 11/12/1941 2555 Transfer out to: DON Doncaster    
Steam A3 4-6-2 31/12/1941 4480 Transfer in from: KX Kings Cross    
Steam A1 4-6-2 05/01/1942 2548 Transfer out to: NWE New England    
Steam A1 4-6-2 05/01/1942 2549 Transfer out to: NWE New England    
Steam A1 4-6-2 05/01/1942 2550 Transfer out to: NWE New England    
Steam A1 4-6-2 07/01/1942 4479 Transfer out to: NWE New England    
Steam J39 0-6-0 17/03/1942 2696 Transfer in from: CLK Colwick    
Steam J39 0-6-0 17/03/1942 2976 Transfer in from: CLK Colwick    
Steam J39 0-6-0 29/04/1942 1996 Transfer in from: MAR March    
Steam J39 0-6-0 29/04/1942 2952 Transfer in from: MAR March    
Steam J39 0-6-0 30/04/1942 1974 Transfer in from: MAR March    
Steam J39 0-6-0 30/04/1942 1997 Transfer in from: MAR March    
Steam J39 0-6-0 02/05/1942 1813 Transfer in from: MAR March    
Steam J39 0-6-0 12/05/1942 1928 Transfer in from: MAR March    
Steam J39 0-6-0 13/05/1942 2696 Transfer out to: CLK Colwick    
Steam J39 0-6-0 14/05/1942 2976 Transfer out to: CLK Colwick    
Steam A4 4-6-2 02/07/1942 4495 Transfer out to: KX Kings Cross    
Steam A1 4-6-2 10/07/1942 2548 Transfer in from: NWE New England    
Steam A1 4-6-2 10/07/1942 2549 Transfer in from: NWE New England    
Steam A3 4-6-2 07/08/1942 2751 Transfer in from: DON Doncaster    
Steam A4 4-6-2 05/10/1942 4495 Transfer in from: KX Kings Cross    
Steam A4 4-6-2 05/10/1942 4903 Transfer in from: KX Kings Cross    
Steam A1 4-6-2 10/10/1942 2560 Transfer out to: NWE New England    
Steam A3 4-6-2 11/10/1942 4479 Transfer in from: NWE New England    
Steam A1 4-6-2 11/10/1942 2548 Transfer out to: NWE New England    
Steam A1 4-6-2 11/10/1942 2549 Transfer out to: NWE New England    
Steam A1 4-6-2 11/10/1942 2553 Transfer out to: NWE New England    
Steam O3 2-8-0 13/11/1942 3462 Transfer in from: NWE New England    
Steam O3 2-8-0 14/11/1942 3469 Transfer in from: NWE New England    
Steam O3 2-8-0 19/11/1942 3468 Transfer in from: NWE New England    
Steam O3 2-8-0 20/11/1942 3460 Transfer in from: NWE New England    
Steam O3 2-8-0 20/11/1942 3464 Transfer in from: NWE New England    
Steam O3 2-8-0 20/11/1942 3467 Transfer in from: NWE New England    
Steam O3 2-8-0 21/11/1942 3463 Transfer in from: NWE New England    
Steam O3 2-8-0 21/11/1942 3470 Transfer in from: NWE New England    
Steam O3 2-8-0 21/11/1942 3471 Transfer in from: DON Doncaster    
Steam O3 2-8-0 21/11/1942 3472 Transfer in from: NWE New England    
Steam O3 2-8-0 21/11/1942 3473 Transfer in from: NWE New England    
Steam A1 4-6-2 21/11/1942 2557 Transfer out to: KX Kings Cross    
Steam O4 2-8-0 21/11/1942 5001 Transfer out to: MEX Mexborough    
Steam O4 2-8-0 21/11/1942 6244 Transfer out to: DON Doncaster    
Steam O4 2-8-0 21/11/1942 6324 Transfer out to: DON Doncaster    
Steam O4 2-8-0 21/11/1942 6512 Transfer out to: DON Doncaster    
Steam O4 2-8-0 21/11/1942 6533 Transfer out to: DON Doncaster    
Steam O4 2-8-0 21/11/1942 6535 Transfer out to: DON Doncaster    
Steam O4 2-8-0 21/11/1942 6604 Transfer out to: DON Doncaster    
Steam O4 2-8-0 21/11/1942 6627 Transfer out to: MEX Mexborough    
Steam O4 2-8-0 21/11/1942 6635 Transfer out to: MEX Mexborough    
Steam A3 4-6-2 22/11/1942 2554 Transfer in from: GOR Gorton    
Steam J39 0-6-0 18/01/1943 2982 Transfer in from: NWE New England    
Steam J39 0-6-0 18/01/1943 3097 Transfer in from: NWE New England    
Steam J39 0-6-0 17/03/1943 2983 Transfer in from: NWE New England    
Steam A1 4-6-2 02/05/1943 2550 Transfer in from: NWE New England    
Steam A1 4-6-2 07/05/1943 2549 Transfer in from: NWE New England    
Steam A1 4-6-2 08/05/1943 2548 Transfer in from: NWE New England    
Steam A3 4-6-2 01/07/1943 2744 Transfer in from: DON Doncaster    
Steam A3 4-6-2 01/07/1943 2752 Transfer in from: DON Doncaster    
Steam A3 4-6-2 01/07/1943 4471 Transfer in from: DON Doncaster    
Steam J39 0-6-0 29/08/1943 2983 Transfer out to: NWE New England    
Steam J39 0-6-0 29/08/1943 3097 Transfer out to: NWE New England    
Steam A1 4-6-2 28/09/1943 2551 Transfer out to: COP Copley Hill (Leeds)    
Steam A1 4-6-2 30/09/1943 2545 Transfer out to: COP Copley Hill (Leeds)    
Steam A3 4-6-2 01/10/1943 4480 Transfer out to: COP Copley Hill (Leeds)    
Steam A4 4-6-2 02/10/1943 4900 Transfer in from: DON Doncaster    
Steam A3 4-6-2 02/10/1943 2554 Transfer out to: COP Copley Hill (Leeds)    
Steam A3 4-6-2 11/10/1943 4480 Transfer in from: COP Copley Hill (Leeds)    
Steam A1 4-6-2 13/10/1943 2548 Transfer out to: DON Doncaster    
Steam A4 4-6-2 21/10/1943 4467 Transfer in from: KX Kings Cross    
Steam A4 4-6-2 21/10/1943 4468 Transfer in from: DON Doncaster    
Steam C1 4-4-2 03/02/1944 4430 Condemned      
Steam C1 4-4-2 09/03/1944 3285 Transfer out to: KX Kings Cross    
Steam O3 2-8-0 12/03/1944 3460 Transfer out to: NWE New England    
Steam O3 2-8-0 12/03/1944 3467 Transfer out to: NWE New England    
Steam J39 0-6-0 18/03/1944 1996 Transfer out to: BOS Boston    
Steam C1 4-4-2 23/03/1944 4438 Transfer out to: KX Kings Cross    
Steam A3 4-6-2 02/04/1944 2752 Transfer out to: NWE New England    
Steam A1 4-6-2 04/04/1944 4475 Transfer in from: NWE New England    
Steam A1 4-6-2 11/04/1944 4476 Transfer in from: NWE New England    
Steam A3 4-6-2 11/04/1944 2744 Transfer out to: NWE New England    
Steam A3 4-6-2 16/04/1944 2752 Transfer in from: NWE New England    
Steam A1 4-6-2 16/04/1944 4475 Transfer out to: KX Kings Cross    
Steam A4 4-6-2 23/04/1944 4498 Transfer in from: KX Kings Cross    
Steam A4 4-6-2 23/04/1944 4902 Transfer in from: KX Kings Cross    
Steam A3 4-6-2 30/04/1944 4471 Transfer out to: NWE New England    
Steam A3 4-6-2 29/05/1944 2752 Transfer out to: NWE New England    
Steam A3 4-6-2 29/05/1944 4480 Transfer out to: NWE New England    
Steam A1 4-6-2 11/06/1944 2550 Transfer out to: NWE New England    
Steam A1 4-6-2 11/06/1944 4476 Transfer out to: NWE New England    
Steam C1 4-4-2 25/06/1944 4415 Transfer out to: NWE New England    
Steam C1 4-4-2 25/06/1944 4432 Transfer out to: NWE New England    
Steam J39 0-6-0 21/07/1944 2952 Transfer out to: NWE New England    
Steam A4 4-6-2 13/08/1944 4466 Transfer out to: KX Kings Cross    
Steam A4 4-6-2 13/08/1944 4467 Transfer out to: KX Kings Cross    
Steam A4 4-6-2 16/08/1944 2509 Transfer in from: KX Kings Cross    
Steam A4 4-6-2 19/08/1944 2510 Transfer in from: KX Kings Cross    
Steam O3 2-8-0 22/09/1944 3471 Transfer out to: NWE New England    
Steam O3 2-8-0 30/09/1944 3460 Transfer in from: NWE New England    
Steam O3 2-8-0 30/09/1944 3467 Transfer in from: NWE New England    
Steam O3 2-8-0 30/09/1944 3471 Transfer in from: NWE New England    
Steam A3 4-6-2 11/10/1944 4471 Transfer in from: NWE New England    
Steam A1 4-6-2 12/10/1944 2548 Transfer in from: DON Doncaster    
Steam A1 4-6-2 11/11/1944 2550 Transfer in from: KX Kings Cross    
Steam A3 4-6-2 06/12/1944 2555 Transfer in from: DON Doncaster    
Steam A1 4-6-2 06/12/1944 2548 Transfer out to: DON Doncaster    
Steam A1 4-6-2 16/12/1944 4476 Transfer in from: KX Kings Cross    
Steam J39 0-6-0 16/04/1945 2693 Transfer in from: BOS Boston    
Steam O3 2-8-0 06/05/1945 3457 Transfer in from: DON Doncaster    
Steam O3 2-8-0 06/05/1945 3474 Transfer in from: DON Doncaster    
Steam O2 2-8-0 17/05/1945 3490 Transfer in from: NWE New England    
Steam O2 2-8-0 25/06/1945 3484 Transfer in from: NWE New England    
Steam O2 2-8-0 25/06/1945 3485 Transfer in from: NWE New England    
Steam O2 2-8-0 25/06/1945 3486 Transfer in from: NWE New England    
Steam O2 2-8-0 25/06/1945 3487 Transfer in from: NWE New England    
Steam O2 2-8-0 25/06/1945 3488 Transfer in from: NWE New England    
Steam O2 2-8-0 25/06/1945 3489 Transfer in from: NWE New England    
Steam O2 2-8-0 25/06/1945 3491 Transfer in from: NWE New England    
Steam O2 2-8-0 25/06/1945 3492 Transfer in from: NWE New England    
Steam O2 2-8-0 25/06/1945 3493 Transfer in from: NWE New England    
Steam O2 2-8-0 25/06/1945 3494 Transfer in from: NWE New England    
Steam O2 2-8-0 25/06/1945 3495 Transfer in from: NWE New England    
Steam O2 2-8-0 25/06/1945 3496 Transfer in from: NWE New England    
Steam O3 2-8-0 25/06/1945 3457 Transfer out to: DON Doncaster    
Steam O3 2-8-0 25/06/1945 3460 Transfer out to: DON Doncaster    
Steam O3 2-8-0 25/06/1945 3462 Transfer out to: DON Doncaster    
Steam O3 2-8-0 25/06/1945 3463 Transfer out to: DON Doncaster    
Steam O3 2-8-0 25/06/1945 3464 Transfer out to: DON Doncaster    
Steam O3 2-8-0 25/06/1945 3467 Transfer out to: DON Doncaster    
Steam O3 2-8-0 25/06/1945 3468 Transfer out to: DON Doncaster    
Steam O3 2-8-0 25/06/1945 3469 Transfer out to: DON Doncaster    
Steam O3 2-8-0 25/06/1945 3470 Transfer out to: DON Doncaster    
Steam O3 2-8-0 25/06/1945 3471 Transfer out to: DON Doncaster    
Steam O3 2-8-0 25/06/1945 3473 Transfer out to: DON Doncaster    
Steam O3 2-8-0 25/06/1945 3474 Transfer out to: DON Doncaster    
Steam J39 0-6-0 01/08/1945 1997 Transfer out to: NWE New England    
Steam O3 2-8-0 01/08/1945 3472 Transfer out to: DON Doncaster    
Steam J39 0-6-0 02/08/1945 1996 Transfer in from: NWE New England    
Steam A4 4-6-2 07/10/1945 4487 Transfer in from: KX Kings Cross    
Steam A1 4-6-2 28/10/1945 2546 Transfer in from: DON Doncaster    
Steam A1 4-6-2 28/10/1945 4481 Transfer in from: DON Doncaster    
Steam J39 0-6-0 18/11/1945 3097 Transfer in from: NWE New England    
Steam J39 0-6-0 31/12/1945 2969 Transfer in from: NWE New England    
Steam J39 0-6-0 31/12/1945 1996 Transfer out to: NWE New England    
Steam J39 0-6-0 06/01/1946 2983 Transfer in from: NWE New England    
Steam J39 0-6-0 17/01/1946 2983 Transfer out to: NWE New England    
Steam C1 4-4-2 30/03/1946 2887 Condemned      
Steam A1 4-6-2 19/05/1946 112 Transfer out to: KX Kings Cross    
Steam A1 4-6-2 19/05/1946 506 Transfer out to: KX Kings Cross    
Steam A1 4-6-2 19/05/1946 515 Transfer out to: KX Kings Cross    
Steam A3 4-6-2 19/05/1946 552 Transfer out to: KX Kings Cross    
Steam C1 4-4-2 15/06/1946 2878 Condemned      
Steam Q4 0-8-0 01/09/1946 6134 Transfer in from: RET Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)    
Steam Q4 0-8-0 28/09/1946 3201 Transfer in from: RET Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)    
Steam Q4 0-8-0 28/09/1946 5065 Transfer in from: RET Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)    
Steam Q4 0-8-0 28/09/1946 5067 Transfer in from: RET Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)    
Steam Q4 0-8-0 28/09/1946 6140 Transfer in from: RET Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)    
Steam J39 0-6-0 28/09/1946 2969 Transfer out to: RET Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)    
Steam J39 0-6-0 28/09/1946 4906 Transfer out to: RET Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)    
Steam J39 0-6-0 28/09/1946 4987 Transfer out to: RET Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)    
Steam Q4 0-8-0 13/10/1946 6176 Transfer in from: RET Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)    
Steam J39 0-6-0 13/10/1946 2982 Transfer out to: RET Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)    
Steam J39 0-6-0 13/10/1946 4956 Transfer out to: RET Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)    
Steam A3 4-6-2 27/10/1946 110 Transfer out to: KX Kings Cross    
Steam A1 4-6-2 27/10/1946 50 Transfer out to: KX Kings Cross    
Steam A1 4-6-2 27/10/1946 51 Transfer out to: KX Kings Cross    
Steam A3 4-6-2 27/10/1946 559 Transfer out to: KX Kings Cross    
Steam A3 4-6-2 27/10/1946 56 Transfer out to: KX Kings Cross    
Steam A3 4-6-2 27/10/1946 97 Transfer out to: KX Kings Cross    
Steam C1 4-4-2 16/11/1946 2831 Condemned      
Steam C1 4-4-2 05/01/1947 2822 Transfer in from: BOS Boston    
Steam O2 2-8-0 09/02/1947 3934 Transfer out to: FRO Frodingham    
Steam O2 2-8-0 09/02/1947 3937 Transfer out to: FRO Frodingham    
Steam O2 2-8-0 09/02/1947 3939 Transfer out to: FRO Frodingham    
Steam O2 2-8-0 09/02/1947 3941 Transfer out to: FRO Frodingham    
Steam J39 0-6-0 09/02/1947 4746 Transfer out to: NWE New England    
Steam J39 0-6-0 09/02/1947 4965 Transfer out to: NWE New England    
Steam Q4 0-8-0 23/02/1947 3229 Transfer in from: MEX Mexborough    
Steam Q4 0-8-0 23/02/1947 3234 Transfer in from: MEX Mexborough    
Steam Q4 0-8-0 23/02/1947 3243 Transfer in from: MEX Mexborough    
Steam C1 4-4-2 30/03/1947 2876 Transfer in from: NWE New England    
Steam C1 4-4-2 30/03/1947 2879 Transfer in from: NWE New England    
Steam Q4 0-8-0 22/04/1947 3225 Transfer out to: ARD Ardsley    
Steam C1 4-4-2 04/05/1947 2870 Transfer in from: BOS Boston    
Steam B1 4-6-0 24/06/1947 1205 1st Allocation        
Steam B1 4-6-0 04/07/1947 1171 Transfer in from: GOR Gorton    
Steam C1 4-4-2 04/07/1947 2879 Condemned      
Steam B1 4-6-0 20/07/1947 1175 Transfer in from: GOR Gorton    
Steam B1 4-6-0 20/07/1947 1177 Transfer in from: GOR Gorton    
Steam C1 4-4-2 14/08/1947 2835 Condemned      
Steam C1 4-4-2 21/08/1947 2812 Condemned      
Steam A3 4-6-2 09/11/1947 106 Transfer in from: NWE New England    
Steam A3 4-6-2 09/11/1947 44 Transfer in from: NWE New England    
Steam A3 4-6-2 w/e 15/11/1947 106 Transfer in from: GRA Grantham    
Steam A3 4-6-2 w/e 15/11/1947 44 Transfer in from: GRA Grantham    
Steam A3 4-6-2 w/e 15/11/1947 106 Transfer out to: GRA Grantham    
Steam A3 4-6-2 w/e 15/11/1947 44 Transfer out to: GRA Grantham    
Steam D3 4-4-0 01/01/1948 2119 Snapshot        
Steam D2 4-4-0 01/01/1948 2161 Snapshot        
Steam D2 4-4-0 01/01/1948 2167 Snapshot        
Steam D2 4-4-0 01/01/1948 2172 Snapshot        
Steam D2 4-4-0 01/01/1948 2173 Snapshot        
Steam J6 0-6-0 01/01/1948 4172 Snapshot        
Steam J6 0-6-0 01/01/1948 4175 Snapshot        
Steam J6 0-6-0 01/01/1948 4178 Snapshot        
Steam J6 0-6-0 01/01/1948 4206 Snapshot        
Steam J6 0-6-0 01/01/1948 4227 Snapshot        
Steam J6 0-6-0 01/01/1948 4237 Snapshot        
Steam J6 0-6-0 01/01/1948 4265 Snapshot        
Steam C12 4-4-2T 01/01/1948 7380 Snapshot        
Steam C12 4-4-2T 01/01/1948 7382 Snapshot        
Steam J52 0-6-0ST 01/01/1948 8801 Snapshot        
Steam J52 0-6-0ST 01/01/1948 8816 Snapshot        
Steam J52 0-6-0ST 01/01/1948 8877 Snapshot        
Steam C1 4-4-2 03/01/1948 2876 Condemned      
Steam B1 4-6-0 04/01/1948 1144 Transfer in from: NWE New England    
Steam B1 4-6-0 w/e 10/01/1948 1144 Transfer in from: GRA Grantham    
Steam B1 4-6-0 w/e 10/01/1948 1144 Transfer out to: GRA Grantham    
Steam J6 0-6-0 w/e 10/01/1948 4265 Transfer out to: NWE New England    
Steam C1 4-4-2 14/02/1948 2870 Condemned      
Steam A4 4-6-2 21/03/1948 21 Transfer in from: KX Kings Cross    
Steam A4 4-6-2 21/03/1948 33 Transfer out to: KX Kings Cross    
Steam A4 4-6-2 11/04/1948 25 Transfer in from: KX Kings Cross    
Steam A4 4-6-2 11/04/1948 26 Transfer in from: KX Kings Cross    
Steam A4 4-6-2 11/04/1948 22 Transfer out to: KX Kings Cross    
Steam A4 4-6-2 11/04/1948 60034 Transfer out to: KX Kings Cross    
Steam A5 4-6-2T 09/05/1948 9817 Transfer in from: NEA Neasden    
Steam A5 4-6-2T 14/05/1948 9812 Transfer in from: NEA Neasden    
Steam A4 4-6-2 23/05/1948 28 Transfer out to: KX Kings Cross    
Steam J6 0-6-0 w/e 29/05/1948 64175 Transfer out to: HIT Hitchin (GNR)    
Steam A4 4-6-2 30/05/1948 13 Transfer in from: KX Kings Cross    
Steam A3 4-6-2 30/05/1948 50 Transfer in from: KX Kings Cross    
Steam A4 4-6-2 30/05/1948 14 Transfer out to: KX Kings Cross    
Steam A4 4-6-2 w/e 05/06/1948 13 Transfer in from: GRA Grantham    
Steam A4 4-6-2 w/e 05/06/1948 13 Transfer out to: GRA Grantham    
Steam A4 4-6-2 16/06/1948 14 Transfer in from: KX Kings Cross    
Steam A3 4-6-2 16/06/1948 50 Transfer out to: KX Kings Cross    
Steam A4 4-6-2 w/e 19/06/1948 14 Transfer in from: GRA Grantham    
Steam A4 4-6-2 w/e 19/06/1948 14 Transfer out to: GRA Grantham    
Steam D2 4-4-0 w/e 09/10/1948 2173 Transfer out to: CLK Colwick    
Steam A1 4-6-2 22/10/1948 60117 1st Allocation        
Steam A1 4-6-2 30/10/1948 60133 1st Allocation        
Steam A5 4-6-2T 23/01/1949 9812 Transfer out to: LNG Langwith Junction    
Steam A5 4-6-2T 23/01/1949 9817 Transfer out to: BOS Boston    
Steam D2 4-4-0 m/e 02/1949 62167 Condemned      
Steam Q4 0-8-0 13/02/1949 63204 Transfer in from: BRN Barnsley    
Steam Q4 0-8-0 13/02/1949 3201 Transfer out to: BRN Barnsley    
Steam Q4 0-8-0 26/02/1949 3206 Condemned      
Steam Q4 0-8-0 06/03/1949 63202 Transfer in from: BRN Barnsley    
Steam Q4 0-8-0 06/03/1949 3229 Transfer out to: BRN Barnsley    
Steam A3 4-6-2 16/05/1949 60090 Transfer in from: LEI Leicester (G.C.)    
Steam A3 4-6-2 16/05/1949 60102 Transfer out to: LEI Leicester (G.C.)    
Steam O2 2-8-0 21/05/1949 63960 Transfer in from: MAR March    
Steam A1 4-6-2 25/05/1949 60148 1st Allocation        
Steam C1 4-4-2 27/05/1949 62810 Condemned      
Steam A5 4-6-2T 29/05/1949 9816 Transfer in from: LIN Lincoln    
Steam A1 4-6-2 31/05/1949 60149 1st Allocation        
Steam A3 4-6-2 31/05/1949 60053 Transfer in from: DON Doncaster    
Steam A5 4-6-2T 10/07/1949 69803 Transfer in from: LIN Lincoln    
Steam Q4 0-8-0 15/08/1949 3228 Condemned      
Steam A5 4-6-2T 11/09/1949 69824 Transfer in from: LIN Lincoln    
Steam B1 4-6-0 29/09/1949 61177 Transfer out to: STR Stratford    
Steam A1 4-6-2 10/10/1949 60149 Transfer out to: KX Kings Cross    
Steam B1 4-6-0 18/11/1949 61144 Transfer out to: STR Stratford    
Steam B12 4-6-0 w/e 26/11/1949 61541 Transfer in from: STR Stratford    
Steam B12 4-6-0 m/e 30/11/1949 61541 Transfer in from: GRA Grantham    
Steam B12 4-6-0 m/e 30/11/1949 61553 Transfer in from: COL Colchester    
Steam B12 4-6-0 m/e 30/11/1949 61565 Transfer in from: STR Stratford    
Steam B12 4-6-0 m/e 30/11/1949 61541 Transfer out to: GRA Grantham    
Steam B1 4-6-0 07/12/1949 61175 Transfer out to: STR Stratford    
Steam B12 4-6-0 w/e 10/12/1949 61565 Transfer in from: GRA Grantham    
Steam B12 4-6-0 w/e 10/12/1949 61565 Transfer out to: GRA Grantham    
Steam B1 4-6-0 11/12/1949 61171 Transfer out to: STR Stratford    
Steam B12 4-6-0 w/e 17/12/1949 61553 Transfer in from: GRA Grantham    
Steam B12 4-6-0 w/e 17/12/1949 61553 Transfer out to: GRA Grantham    
Steam B1 4-6-0 18/12/1949 61205 Transfer out to: STR Stratford    
Steam B12 4-6-0 w/e 24/12/1949 61554 Transfer in from: STR Stratford    
Steam A1 4-6-2 19/03/1950 60123 Transfer in from: DON Doncaster    
Steam A1 4-6-2 19/03/1950 60149 Transfer in from: KX Kings Cross    
Steam A4 4-6-2 19/03/1950 60025 Transfer out to: 34A Kings Cross    
Steam A3 4-6-2 02/04/1950 60090 Transfer out to: 36A Doncaster    
Steam A4 4-6-2 19/04/1950 60025 Transfer in from: 34A Kings Cross    
Steam A1 4-6-2 19/04/1950 60149 Transfer out to: 34A Kings Cross    
Steam A3 4-6-2 23/04/1950 60044 Transfer out to: 37B Copley Hill (Leeds)    
Steam J52 0-6-0ST m/e 05/1950 8816 Transfer out to:        
Steam O2 2-8-0 14/05/1950 63948 Transfer in from: MAR March    
Steam O2 2-8-0 14/05/1950 63950 Transfer in from: MAR March    
Steam A4 4-6-2 31/05/1950 60014 Transfer out to: 34A Kings Cross    
Steam A4 4-6-2 31/05/1950 60025 Transfer out to: 34A Kings Cross    
Steam O2 2-8-0 04/06/1950 63949 Transfer in from: MAR March    
Steam A4 4-6-2 04/06/1950 60007 Transfer out to: 34A Kings Cross    
Steam A4 4-6-2 04/06/1950 60008 Transfer out to: 34A Kings Cross    
Steam A4 4-6-2 04/06/1950 60013 Transfer out to: 34A Kings Cross    
Steam A4 4-6-2 04/06/1950 60021 Transfer out to: 34A Kings Cross    
Steam A4 4-6-2 04/06/1950 60030 Transfer out to: 34A Kings Cross    
Steam A4 4-6-2 04/06/1950 60032 Transfer out to: 34A Kings Cross    
Steam A3 4-6-2 04/06/1950 60039 Transfer out to: 34A Kings Cross    
Steam A1 4-6-2 04/06/1950 60117 Transfer out to: 37B Copley Hill (Leeds)    
Steam A1 4-6-2 04/06/1950 60123 Transfer out to: 37B Copley Hill (Leeds)    
Steam A1 4-6-2 04/06/1950 60133 Transfer out to: 37B Copley Hill (Leeds)    
Steam A1 4-6-2 04/06/1950 60148 Transfer out to: 34A Kings Cross    
Steam Q4 0-8-0 04/06/1950 63202 Transfer out to: 37A Ardsley    
Steam Q4 0-8-0 04/06/1950 63234 Transfer out to: 37A Ardsley    
Steam Q4 0-8-0 04/06/1950 63240 Transfer out to: 37A Ardsley    
Steam Q4 0-8-0 11/06/1950 63204 Transfer out to: 37A Ardsley    
Steam Q4 0-8-0 11/06/1950 63207 Transfer out to: 37A Ardsley    
Steam Q4 0-8-0 11/06/1950 63243 Transfer out to: 37A Ardsley    
Steam O2 2-8-0 18/06/1950 63923 Transfer in from: LNG Langwith Junction    
Steam O2 2-8-0 18/06/1950 63965 Transfer in from: LNG Langwith Junction    
Steam O2 2-8-0 18/06/1950 63966 Transfer in from: LNG Langwith Junction    
Steam D2 4-4-0 m/e 07/1950 62161 Condemned      
Steam O2 2-8-0 09/07/1950 63933 Transfer out to: 35A New England    
Steam O2 2-8-0 09/07/1950 63948 Transfer out to: 35A New England    
Steam O2 2-8-0 20/08/1950 63923 Transfer out to: 35A New England    
Steam O2 2-8-0 20/08/1950 63935 Transfer out to: 35A New England    
Steam A5 4-6-2T 15/10/1950 69824 Transfer out to: 40F Boston    
Steam A5 4-6-2T 15/10/1950 9816 Transfer out to: 40A Lincoln    
Steam O2 2-8-0 29/10/1950 63933 Transfer in from: 35A New England    
Steam O2 2-8-0 29/10/1950 63935 Transfer in from: 35A New England    
Steam A5 4-6-2T 29/10/1950 69803 Transfer out to: 40F Boston    
Steam K2 2-6-0 19/11/1950 61729 Transfer in from: NWE New England    
Steam J6 0-6-0 4w/e 25/11/1950 64187 Transfer in from: NWE New England    
Steam C1 4-4-2 27/11/1950 62822 Condemned      
Steam J52 0-6-0ST m/e 12/1950 68801 Condemned      
Steam J52 0-6-0ST 4w/e 23/12/1950 68798 Transfer in from: NWE New England    
Steam O2 2-8-0 14/01/1951 63948 Transfer in from: 35A New England    
Steam K2 2-6-0 21/01/1951 61729 Transfer out to: 38A Colwick    
Steam J6 0-6-0 4w/e 17/02/1951 64186 Transfer in from: NWE New England    
Steam B1 4-6-0 06/03/1951 61143 Transfer in from: NWE New England    
Steam O2 2-8-0 11/03/1951 63923 Transfer in from: 35A New England    
Steam D2 4-4-0 m/e 06/1951 62172 Condemned      
Steam J52 0-6-0ST 4w/e 18/08/1951 68780 Transfer in from: KX Kings Cross    
Steam A3 4-6-2 09/09/1951 60039 Transfer in from: 34A Kings Cross    
Steam A3 4-6-2 09/09/1951 60047 Transfer in from: 34A Kings Cross    
Steam A3 4-6-2 09/09/1951 60063 Transfer in from: 34A Kings Cross    
Steam A3 4-6-2 09/09/1951 60065 Transfer in from: 34A Kings Cross    
Steam A3 4-6-2 09/09/1951 60067 Transfer in from: 34A Kings Cross    
Steam A3 4-6-2 09/09/1951 60105 Transfer in from: KX Kings Cross    
Steam A3 4-6-2 09/09/1951 60109 Transfer in from: KX Kings Cross    
Steam A3 4-6-2 09/09/1951 60110 Transfer in from: KX Kings Cross    
Steam A1/1 4-6-2 09/09/1951 60113 Transfer in from: 35A New England    
Steam A1 4-6-2 09/09/1951 60128 Transfer in from: 34A Kings Cross    
Steam A1 4-6-2 09/09/1951 60130 Transfer in from: KX Kings Cross    
Steam A1 4-6-2 09/09/1951 60131 Transfer in from: KX Kings Cross    
Steam A1 4-6-2 09/09/1951 60136 Transfer in from: 34A Kings Cross    
Steam A1 4-6-2 09/09/1951 60148 Transfer in from: 34A Kings Cross    
Steam A1 4-6-2 09/09/1951 60149 Transfer in from: 34A Kings Cross    
Steam A1 4-6-2 09/09/1951 60156 Transfer in from: KX Kings Cross    
Steam A1 4-6-2 09/09/1951 60157 Transfer in from: KX Kings Cross    
Steam A1 4-6-2 09/09/1951 60158 Transfer in from: KX Kings Cross    
Steam A4 4-6-2 09/09/1951 60015 Transfer out to: 34A Kings Cross    
Steam A4 4-6-2 09/09/1951 60026 Transfer out to: 34A Kings Cross    
Steam B1 4-6-0 09/09/1951 61143 Transfer out to: 35A New England    
Steam O2 2-8-0 16/09/1951 63933 Transfer out to: 35A New England    
Steam O2 2-8-0 16/09/1951 63949 Transfer out to: 35A New England    
Steam O2 2-8-0 16/09/1951 63950 Transfer out to: 35A New England    
Steam D3 4-4-0 m/e 10/1951 62000 Condemned      
Steam A3 4-6-2 07/10/1951 60056 Transfer in from: 36A Doncaster    
Steam A3 4-6-2 07/10/1951 60112 Transfer in from: 36A Doncaster    
Steam O2 2-8-0 28/10/1951 63933 Transfer in from: 35A New England    
Steam O2 2-8-0 28/10/1951 63950 Transfer in from: 35A New England    
Steam O2 2-8-0 28/10/1951 63935 Transfer out to: 36B Mexborough    
Steam O2 2-8-0 28/10/1951 63965 Transfer out to: 36B Mexborough    
Steam A1 4-6-2 18/05/1952 60117 Transfer in from: 37B Copley Hill (Leeds)    
Steam A3 4-6-2 18/05/1952 60067 Transfer out to: 36A Doncaster    
Steam A3 4-6-2 25/05/1952 60056 Transfer out to: 36A Doncaster    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 5w/e 21/06/1952 43084 Transfer in from: 35A New England    
Steam J6 0-6-0 5w/e 21/06/1952 64172 Transfer out to: 35A New England    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 4w/e 15/11/1952 43087 Transfer in from: 35A New England    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 4w/e 15/11/1952 43084 Transfer out to: 35A New England    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 4w/e 13/12/1952 43058 Transfer in from: 35A New England    
Steam J52 0-6-0ST 4w/e 13/12/1952 68815 Transfer in from: 36C Frodingham    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 4w/e 13/12/1952 43087 Transfer out to: 35A New England    
Steam J52 0-6-0ST 4w/e 13/12/1952 68798 Transfer out to: 36C Frodingham    
Steam B12 4-6-0 4w/e 14/02/1953 61567 Transfer in from: 30E Colchester    
Steam B12 4-6-0 4w/e 14/02/1953 61571 Transfer in from: STR Stratford    
Steam B12 4-6-0 4w/e 14/02/1953 61572 Transfer in from: STR Stratford    
Steam B12 4-6-0 4w/e 14/02/1953 61574 Transfer in from: STR Stratford    
Steam B12 4-6-0 4w/e 14/02/1953 61580 Transfer in from: 30E Colchester    
Steam J6 0-6-0 4w/e 14/02/1953 64186 Transfer out to: 34D Hitchin (GNR)    
Steam J6 0-6-0 4w/e 14/02/1953 64206 Transfer out to: 34D Hitchin (GNR)    
Steam J6 0-6-0 4w/e 14/02/1953 64237 Transfer out to: 34D Hitchin (GNR)    
Steam A3 4-6-2 15/02/1953 60056 Transfer in from: 34A Kings Cross    
Steam A3 4-6-2 15/02/1953 60062 Transfer in from: 36A Doncaster    
Steam A1 4-6-2 15/02/1953 60114 Transfer in from: 37B Copley Hill (Leeds)    
Steam A1 4-6-2 15/02/1953 60125 Transfer in from: 37B Copley Hill (Leeds)    
Steam A1 4-6-2 15/02/1953 60144 Transfer in from: 37A Ardsley    
Steam A3 4-6-2 15/02/1953 60106 Transfer out to: 34A Kings Cross    
Steam A3 4-6-2 15/02/1953 60112 Transfer out to: 36A Doncaster    
Steam A1 4-6-2 15/02/1953 60117 Transfer out to: 37B Copley Hill (Leeds)    
Steam A1 4-6-2 15/02/1953 60130 Transfer out to: 37A Ardsley    
Steam A1 4-6-2 15/02/1953 60131 Transfer out to: 37B Copley Hill (Leeds)    
Steam A3 4-6-2 22/02/1953 60061 Transfer in from: 34E Neasden    
Steam A3 4-6-2 22/02/1953 60063 Transfer out to: 34E Neasden    
Steam B12 4-6-0 5w/e 21/03/1953 61571 Transfer out to: 32B Ipswich    
Steam B12 4-6-0 5w/e 21/03/1953 61572 Transfer out to: 32B Ipswich    
Steam O2 2-8-0 05/04/1953 63946 Transfer in from: 36A Doncaster    
Steam A1 4-6-2 07/06/1953 60125 Transfer out to: 37B Copley Hill (Leeds)    
Steam A1 4-6-2 07/06/1953 60158 Transfer out to: 37B Copley Hill (Leeds)    
Steam A3 4-6-2 18/10/1953 60109 Transfer out to: 36A Doncaster    
Steam A1 4-6-2 18/10/1953 60148 Transfer out to: 37B Copley Hill (Leeds)    
Steam A3 4-6-2 25/10/1953 60106 Transfer in from: 34A Kings Cross    
Steam A3 4-6-2 25/10/1953 60062 Transfer out to: 34A Kings Cross    
Steam A3 4-6-2 15/11/1953 60051 Transfer in from: NEA Neasden    
Steam A3 4-6-2 15/11/1953 60103 Transfer in from: 38C Leicester (G.C.)    
Steam J52 0-6-0ST m/e 01/1954 68780 Condemned      
Steam J52 0-6-0ST 4w/e 20/02/1954 68831 Transfer in from: 35C Spital Bridge    
Steam L1 2-6-4T 4w/e 20/03/1954 67772 Transfer in from:        
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 4w/e 20/03/1954 43058 Transfer out to: 35A New England    
Steam A1 4-6-2 02/05/1954 60125 Transfer in from: 37B Copley Hill (Leeds)    
Steam A1 4-6-2 02/05/1954 60148 Transfer in from: 37B Copley Hill (Leeds)    
Steam A1 4-6-2 02/05/1954 60158 Transfer in from: 37B Copley Hill (Leeds)    
Steam A3 4-6-2 02/05/1954 60051 Transfer out to: 37B Copley Hill (Leeds)    
Steam A3 4-6-2 02/05/1954 60053 Transfer out to: 37B Copley Hill (Leeds)    
Steam A3 4-6-2 02/05/1954 60106 Transfer out to: 37B Copley Hill (Leeds)    
Steam A5 4-6-2T 16/05/1954 69814 Transfer in from: 34E Neasden    
Steam A5 4-6-2T 16/05/1954 69827 Transfer in from: NEA Neasden    
Steam C12 4-4-2T 4w/e 22/05/1954 67362 Transfer in from: NWE New England    
Steam L1 2-6-4T 4w/e 22/05/1954 67772 Transfer out to: 34E Neasden    
Steam C12 4-4-2T 4w/e 19/06/1954 67380 Transfer out to: 35C Spital Bridge    
Steam A2 4-6-2 20/06/1954 60533 Transfer in from: 35A New England    
Steam A3 4-6-2 20/06/1954 60047 Transfer out to: 34A Kings Cross    
Steam A3 4-6-2 20/06/1954 60103 Transfer out to: 34A Kings Cross    
Steam A3 4-6-2 29/08/1954 60103 Transfer in from: 34A Kings Cross    
Steam A3 4-6-2 29/08/1954 60061 Transfer out to: 34A Kings Cross    
Steam A3 4-6-2 17/10/1954 60047 Transfer in from: 34A Kings Cross    
Steam A3 4-6-2 17/10/1954 60061 Transfer in from: 34A Kings Cross    
Steam C12 4-4-2T m/e 04/1955 67382 Condemned      
Steam C12 4-4-2T 5w/e 23/04/1955 67391 Transfer in from: HLB Hull Botanic Gardens    
Steam B12 4-6-0 5w/e 23/07/1955 61565 Transfer out to: 35C Spital Bridge    
Steam A1 4-6-2 28/08/1955 60122 Transfer in from: 37B Copley Hill (Leeds)    
Steam A1 4-6-2 28/08/1955 60148 Transfer out to: 37B Copley Hill (Leeds)    
Steam V2 2-6-2 18/09/1955 60845 Transfer in from: 35A New England    
Steam V2 2-6-2 18/09/1955 60966 Transfer in from: 35A New England    
Steam A1 4-6-2 18/12/1955 60119 Transfer in from: COP Copley Hill (Leeds)    
Steam A1 4-6-2 18/12/1955 60139 Transfer in from: 37B Copley Hill (Leeds)    
Steam B12 4-6-0 5w/e 24/03/1956 61554 Transfer out to: 35C Spital Bridge    
Steam J69 0-6-0T 4w/e 21/04/1956 68491 Transfer in from: 31A Cambridge    
Steam J52 0-6-0ST 4w/e 21/04/1956 68877 Transfer out to: 38A Colwick    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 4w/e 25/05/1956 47300 Transfer in from: 33A Plaistow    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 4w/e 25/05/1956 47429 Transfer in from: 35A New England    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 4w/e 25/05/1956 47458 Transfer in from: 35A New England    
Steam J69 0-6-0T 4w/e 25/05/1956 68491 Transfer out to: 35A New England    
Steam J52 0-6-0ST 4w/e 25/05/1956 68831 Transfer out to: 35A New England    
Steam A3 4-6-2 16/09/1956 60044 Transfer in from: 34A Kings Cross    
Steam A3 4-6-2 16/09/1956 60050 Transfer in from: 34A Kings Cross    
Steam A3 4-6-2 16/09/1956 60063 Transfer in from: 34A Kings Cross    
Steam A1 4-6-2 16/09/1956 60149 Transfer out to: 34A Kings Cross    
Steam A1 4-6-2 16/09/1956 60156 Transfer out to: 34A Kings Cross    
Steam A1 4-6-2 16/09/1956 60157 Transfer out to: 34A Kings Cross    
Steam A2 4-6-2 16/09/1956 60533 Transfer out to: 35A New England    
Steam V2 2-6-2 16/09/1956 60845 Transfer out to: 35A New England    
Steam V2 2-6-2 16/09/1956 60966 Transfer out to: 35A New England    
Steam B12 4-6-0 4w/e 22/09/1956 61567 Transfer out to: 35C Spital Bridge    
Steam A3 4-6-2 07/10/1956 60039 Transfer out to: 38C Leicester (G.C.)    
Steam L1 2-6-4T 4w/e 20/10/1956 67776 Transfer in from: 34A Kings Cross    
Steam L1 2-6-4T 4w/e 20/10/1956 67800 Transfer in from: 34A Kings Cross    
Steam B12 4-6-0 01/01/1957 61541 Condemned      
Steam B12 4-6-0 01/01/1957 61574 Condemned      
Steam B12 4-6-0 5w/e 19/01/1957 61516 Transfer in from: STR Stratford    
Steam B12 4-6-0 5w/e 19/01/1957 61555 Transfer in from: 30E Colchester    
Steam B1 4-6-0 24/02/1957 61060 Transfer in from: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam B1 4-6-0 24/02/1957 61074 Transfer in from: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam A4 4-6-2 07/04/1957 60003 Transfer in from: KX Kings Cross    
Steam A4 4-6-2 07/04/1957 60008 Transfer in from: 34A Kings Cross    
Steam A4 4-6-2 07/04/1957 60010 Transfer in from: KX Kings Cross    
Steam A4 4-6-2 07/04/1957 60030 Transfer in from: 34A Kings Cross    
Steam A3 4-6-2 07/04/1957 60044 Transfer out to: 34A Kings Cross    
Steam A3 4-6-2 07/04/1957 60103 Transfer out to: 34A Kings Cross    
Steam A1 4-6-2 07/04/1957 60136 Transfer out to: 34A Kings Cross    
Steam A1 4-6-2 07/04/1957 60139 Transfer out to: 34A Kings Cross    
Steam B12 4-6-0 5w/e 20/04/1957 61516 Transfer out to: 31C Kings Lynn    
Steam B12 4-6-0 5w/e 20/04/1957 61553 Transfer out to: 31A Cambridge    
Steam B12 4-6-0 5w/e 20/04/1957 61555 Transfer out to: 31A Cambridge    
Steam B12 4-6-0 5w/e 20/04/1957 61580 Transfer out to: 31A Cambridge    
Steam V2 2-6-2 16/05/1957 60863 Transfer in from: 38C Leicester (G.C.)    
Steam A3 4-6-2 16/06/1957 60054 Transfer in from: 34A Kings Cross    
Steam V2 2-6-2 16/06/1957 60854 Transfer in from: NWE New England    
Steam V2 2-6-2 16/06/1957 60911 Transfer in from: NWE New England    
Steam A3 4-6-2 16/06/1957 60110 Transfer out to: 34A Kings Cross    
Steam A1 4-6-2 16/06/1957 60125 Transfer out to: 34A Kings Cross    
Steam A1 4-6-2 16/06/1957 60158 Transfer out to: 34A Kings Cross    
Steam C12 4-4-2T 5w/e 20/07/1957 67352 Transfer in from: 35C Spital Bridge    
Steam C12 4-4-2T 5w/e 20/07/1957 67367 Transfer in from: 35C Spital Bridge    
Steam C12 4-4-2T 5w/e 20/07/1957 67397 Transfer in from: 35C Spital Bridge    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 5w/e 20/07/1957 47300 Transfer out to: 35C Spital Bridge    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 5w/e 20/07/1957 47429 Transfer out to: 35C Spital Bridge    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 5w/e 20/07/1957 47458 Transfer out to: 35C Spital Bridge    
Steam V2 2-6-2 11/08/1957 60821 Transfer in from: 35A New England    
Steam V2 2-6-2 11/08/1957 60842 Transfer in from: NWE New England    
Steam A3 4-6-2 05/09/1957 60106 Transfer in from: 38C Leicester (G.C.)    
Steam A3 4-6-2 15/09/1957 60049 Transfer in from: 38C Leicester (G.C.)    
Steam A3 4-6-2 15/09/1957 60107 Transfer in from: 38C Leicester (G.C.)    
Steam A3 4-6-2 15/09/1957 60111 Transfer in from: 38C Leicester (G.C.)    
Steam A2 4-6-2 15/09/1957 60520 Transfer in from: NWE New England    
Steam A2 4-6-2 15/09/1957 60533 Transfer in from: 35A New England    
Steam A4 4-6-2 15/09/1957 60003 Transfer out to: 34A Kings Cross    
Steam A4 4-6-2 15/09/1957 60008 Transfer out to: 34A Kings Cross    
Steam A4 4-6-2 15/09/1957 60010 Transfer out to: 34A Kings Cross    
Steam A4 4-6-2 15/09/1957 60030 Transfer out to: 34A Kings Cross    
Steam A1/1 4-6-2 15/09/1957 60113 Transfer out to: 34A Kings Cross    
Steam A1 4-6-2 15/09/1957 60119 Transfer out to: 34A Kings Cross    
Steam A1 4-6-2 15/09/1957 60122 Transfer out to: 34A Kings Cross    
Steam A1 4-6-2 15/09/1957 60128 Transfer out to: 34A Kings Cross    
Steam A1 4-6-2 15/09/1957 60144 Transfer out to: 34A Kings Cross    
Steam V2 2-6-2 15/09/1957 60842 Transfer out to: 38C Leicester (G.C.)    
Steam V2 2-6-2 15/09/1957 60854 Transfer out to: 38C Leicester (G.C.)    
Steam V2 2-6-2 15/09/1957 60863 Transfer out to: 38C Leicester (G.C.)    
Steam V2 2-6-2 15/09/1957 60911 Transfer out to: 38C Leicester (G.C.)    
Steam A1 4-6-2 22/09/1957 60114 Transfer out to: 36A Doncaster    
Steam B1 4-6-0 06/10/1957 61389 Transfer in from: 35A New England    
Steam B1 4-6-0 06/10/1957 61392 Transfer in from: 35A New England    
Steam B1 4-6-0 06/10/1957 61060 Transfer out to: 35A New England    
Steam B1 4-6-0 06/10/1957 61074 Transfer out to: 35A New England    
Steam V2 2-6-2 13/10/1957 60893 Transfer in from: 35A New England    
Steam V2 2-6-2 13/10/1957 60966 Transfer in from: 35A New England    
Steam C12 4-4-2T m/e 01/1958 67362 Condemned      
Steam C12 4-4-2T m/e 01/1958 67391 Condemned      
Steam J6 0-6-0 02/01/1958 64187 Condemned      
Steam J6 0-6-0 4w/e 08/01/1958 64181 Transfer in from: 35A New England    
Steam J6 0-6-0 4w/e 08/01/1958 64246 Transfer in from: NWE New England    
Steam J52 0-6-0ST 4w/e 08/01/1958 68815 Transfer out to: 36A Doncaster    
Steam A5 4-6-2T 13/04/1958 69824 Transfer in from: 40B Immingham    
Steam J69 0-6-0T 4w/e 10/05/1958 68626 Transfer in from: 35A New England    
Steam J68 0-6-0T 4w/e 10/05/1958 68638 Transfer in from: 34D Hitchin (GNR)    
Steam L1 2-6-4T 4w/e 10/05/1958 67776 Transfer out to: 34A Kings Cross    
Steam A2 4-6-2 08/06/1958 60513 Transfer in from: NWE New England    
Steam A2 4-6-2 08/06/1958 60533 Transfer out to: 34A Kings Cross    
Steam A5 4-6-2T 08/06/1958 69824 Transfer out to: 40A Lincoln    
Steam Standard Class 9 2-10-0 5w/e 14/06/1958 92187 Transfer in from: 35A New England    
Steam Standard Class 9 2-10-0 5w/e 14/06/1958 92188 Transfer in from: 35A New England    
Steam J6 0-6-0 4w/e 19/07/1958 64178 Transfer out to: 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)    
Steam J6 0-6-0 28/07/1958 64227 Condemned      
Steam C12 4-4-2T m/e 08/1958 67367 Condemned      
Steam L1 2-6-4T 4w/e 11/10/1958 67794 Transfer in from: 34A Kings Cross    
Steam L1 2-6-4T 4w/e 11/10/1958 67800 Transfer out to: 34A Kings Cross    
Steam Standard Class 9 2-10-0 4w/e 11/10/1958 92187 Transfer out to: 34E New England    
Steam Standard Class 9 2-10-0 4w/e 11/10/1958 92188 Transfer out to: 34E New England    
Steam C12 4-4-2T m/e 11/1958 67352 Condemned      
Steam N2 0-6-2T w/e 22/11/1958 69516 Transfer in from: 34B Hornsey    
Steam N2 0-6-2T w/e 22/11/1958 69552 Transfer in from: 34B Hornsey    
Steam C12 4-4-2T m/e 12/1958 67397 Condemned      
Steam A2 4-6-2 14/12/1958 60523 Transfer in from: NWE New England    
Steam A2 4-6-2 14/12/1958 60533 Transfer in from: 34A Kings Cross    
Steam V2 2-6-2 14/12/1958 60821 Transfer out to: 34E New England    
Steam V2 2-6-2 14/12/1958 60893 Transfer out to: 34E New England    
Steam V2 2-6-2 14/12/1958 60966 Transfer out to: 34E New England    
Steam J69 0-6-0T w/e 31/01/1959 68635 Transfer in from: 35A New England    
Steam J68 0-6-0T m/e 02/1959 68638 Condemned      
Steam A3 4-6-2 08/02/1959 60048 Transfer in from: 36A Doncaster    
Steam A3 4-6-2 08/02/1959 60061 Transfer out to: 36A Doncaster    
Steam A2 4-6-2 12/04/1959 60523 Transfer out to: 34E New England    
Steam J6 0-6-0 06/06/1959 64246 Condemned      
Steam A3 4-6-2 14/06/1959 60046 Transfer in from: 36A Doncaster    
Steam A3 4-6-2 14/06/1959 60064 Transfer in from: 36A Doncaster    
Steam A3 4-6-2 14/06/1959 60067 Transfer in from: 36A Doncaster    
Steam A3 4-6-2 14/06/1959 60102 Transfer in from: 36A Doncaster    
Steam A3 4-6-2 14/06/1959 60104 Transfer in from: 36A Doncaster    
Steam A3 4-6-2 14/06/1959 60112 Transfer in from: 36A Doncaster    
Steam V2 2-6-2 14/06/1959 60875 Transfer in from: 35A New England    
Steam V2 2-6-2 14/06/1959 60908 Transfer in from: 35A New England    
Steam V2 2-6-2 14/06/1959 60912 Transfer in from: NWE New England    
Steam B1 4-6-0 14/06/1959 61251 Transfer in from: 34D Hitchin (GNR)    
Steam B1 4-6-0 14/06/1959 61367 Transfer in from: 34D Hitchin (GNR)    
Steam O2 2-8-0 14/06/1959 63957 Transfer in from: 36A Doncaster    
Steam O2 2-8-0 14/06/1959 63963 Transfer in from: 36A Doncaster    
Steam A2 4-6-2 14/06/1959 60513 Transfer out to: 34E New England    
Steam A2 4-6-2 14/06/1959 60520 Transfer out to: 34E New England    
Steam A2 4-6-2 14/06/1959 60533 Transfer out to: 34E New England    
Steam L1 2-6-4T w/e 20/06/1959 67791 Transfer in from: 34D Hitchin (GNR)    
Steam N2 0-6-2T w/e 20/06/1959 69505 Transfer in from: HSY Hornsey    
Steam N2 0-6-2T w/e 20/06/1959 69560 Transfer in from: 34B Hornsey    
Steam N2 0-6-2T w/e 20/06/1959 69561 Transfer in from: 34B Hornsey    
Steam J6 0-6-0 01/08/1959 64181 Condemned      
Steam A3 4-6-2 13/09/1959 60067 Transfer out to: 34E New England    
Steam V2 2-6-2 13/09/1959 60875 Transfer out to: 36A Doncaster    
Steam V2 2-6-2 13/09/1959 60908 Transfer out to: 36A Doncaster    
Steam V2 2-6-2 13/09/1959 60912 Transfer out to: 36A Doncaster    
Steam A3 4-6-2 01/11/1959 60104 Transfer out to: 34A Kings Cross    
Steam A5 4-6-2T 02/11/1959 69827 Condemned      
Steam L1 2-6-4T w/e 07/11/1959 67761 Transfer in from: 34D Hitchin (GNR)    
Steam L1 2-6-4T w/e 07/11/1959 67785 Transfer in from: 34D Hitchin (GNR)    
Steam L1 2-6-4T w/e 21/11/1959 67794 Transfer out to: 34A Kings Cross    
Steam A5 4-6-2T 27/12/1959 69814 Transfer out to: 34A Kings Cross    
Steam N2 0-6-2T m/e 05/1960 69552 Condemned      
Steam J69 0-6-0T w/e 07/05/1960 68626 Transfer out to: 40E Colwick    
Steam J69 0-6-0T w/e 07/05/1960 68635 Transfer out to: 40E Colwick    
Steam N2 0-6-2T w/e 04/06/1960 69549 Transfer in from: KX Kings Cross    
Steam V2 2-6-2 12/06/1960 60841 Transfer in from: 36A Doncaster    
Steam V2 2-6-2 12/06/1960 60857 Transfer in from: DON Doncaster    
Steam V2 2-6-2 12/06/1960 60896 Transfer in from: 36A Doncaster    
Steam V2 2-6-2 12/06/1960 60909 Transfer in from: 36A Doncaster    
Steam N2 0-6-2T w/e 18/06/1960 69531 Transfer in from: 34C Hatfield    
Steam N2 0-6-2T w/e 18/06/1960 69580 Transfer in from: 34C Hatfield    
Steam N2 0-6-2T m/e 10/1960 69560 Condemned      
Steam A3 4-6-2 09/10/1960 60102 Transfer out to: 34A Kings Cross    
Steam A3 4-6-2 09/10/1960 60107 Transfer out to: 34A Kings Cross    
Steam V2 2-6-2 09/10/1960 60841 Transfer out to: 34E New England    
Steam V2 2-6-2 09/10/1960 60857 Transfer out to: 36A Doncaster    
Steam V2 2-6-2 09/10/1960 60896 Transfer out to: 36A Doncaster    
Steam V2 2-6-2 09/10/1960 60909 Transfer out to: 36A Doncaster    
Steam A3 4-6-2 30/10/1960 60063 Transfer out to: 34A Kings Cross    
Steam O2 2-8-0 08/11/1960 63950 Condemned      
Steam N2 0-6-2T 10/11/1960 69505 Condemned      
Steam L1 2-6-4T w/e 12/11/1960 67768 Transfer in from: 34A Kings Cross    
Steam L1 2-6-4T w/e 12/11/1960 67776 Transfer in from: 34A Kings Cross    
Steam O2 2-8-0 20/11/1960 63982 Transfer in from: 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)    
Steam O2 2-8-0 27/11/1960 63943 Transfer in from: 36A Doncaster    
Steam O2 2-8-0 27/11/1960 63956 Transfer in from: 36A Doncaster    
Steam N2 0-6-2T m/e 01/1961 69516 Condemned      
Steam L1 2-6-4T m/e 02/1961 67768 Condemned      
Steam N2 0-6-2T w/e 18/02/1961 69583 Transfer in from: KX Kings Cross    
Steam L1 2-6-4T w/e 25/03/1961 67773 Transfer in from: 34A Kings Cross    
Steam N2 0-6-2T m/e 05/1961 69561 Condemned      
Steam V2 2-6-2 07/05/1961 60854 Transfer in from: 34A Kings Cross    
Steam V2 2-6-2 07/05/1961 60871 Transfer in from: 34A Kings Cross    
Steam L1 2-6-4T w/e 27/05/1961 67752 Transfer in from: 34A Kings Cross    
Steam L1 2-6-4T w/e 27/05/1961 67757 Transfer in from: 34A Kings Cross    
Steam L1 2-6-4T w/e 27/05/1961 67772 Transfer in from: 34A Kings Cross    
Steam L1 2-6-4T w/e 27/05/1961 67774 Transfer in from: 34A Kings Cross    
Steam L1 2-6-4T w/e 27/05/1961 67794 Transfer in from: 34A Kings Cross    
Steam N2 0-6-2T w/e 27/05/1961 69531 Transfer out to: 34E New England    
Steam N2 0-6-2T w/e 27/05/1961 69549 Transfer out to: 34E New England    
Steam N2 0-6-2T w/e 27/05/1961 69580 Transfer out to: 34E New England    
Steam N2 0-6-2T w/e 27/05/1961 69583 Transfer out to: 34E New England    
Steam V2 2-6-2 11/06/1961 60866 Transfer in from: 36A Doncaster    
Steam V2 2-6-2 11/06/1961 60889 Transfer in from: DON Doncaster    
Steam V2 2-6-2 11/06/1961 60905 Transfer in from: 36A Doncaster    
Steam V2 2-6-2 11/06/1961 60912 Transfer in from: 36A Doncaster    
Steam V2 2-6-2 11/06/1961 60921 Transfer in from: DON Doncaster    
Steam V2 2-6-2 11/06/1961 60854 Transfer out to: 34A Kings Cross    
Steam V2 2-6-2 11/06/1961 60871 Transfer out to: 34A Kings Cross    
Steam O2 2-8-0 11/06/1961 63936 Transfer out to: 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)    
Steam O2 2-8-0 11/06/1961 63943 Transfer out to: 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)    
Steam O2 2-8-0 11/06/1961 63966 Transfer out to: 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)    
Steam O2 2-8-0 04/07/1961 63957 Condemned      
Steam V2 2-6-2 16/07/1961 60872 Transfer in from: DON Doncaster    
Steam O2 2-8-0 16/07/1961 63943 Transfer in from: 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)    
Steam O2 2-8-0 16/07/1961 63946 Transfer out to: 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)    
Steam A3 4-6-2 04/09/1961 60064 Condemned      
Steam V2 2-6-2 10/09/1961 60866 Transfer out to: 34E New England    
Steam V2 2-6-2 10/09/1961 60872 Transfer out to: 36A Doncaster    
Steam V2 2-6-2 10/09/1961 60889 Transfer out to: 36A Doncaster    
Steam V2 2-6-2 10/09/1961 60905 Transfer out to: 36A Doncaster    
Steam V2 2-6-2 10/09/1961 60912 Transfer out to: 34E New England    
Steam V2 2-6-2 10/09/1961 60921 Transfer out to: 36A Doncaster    
Steam L1 2-6-4T m/e 10/1961 67794 Condemned      
Steam L1 2-6-4T w/e 11/11/1961 67796 Transfer in from: 34E New England    
Steam L1 2-6-4T w/e 11/11/1961 67798 Transfer in from: 34E New England    
Steam L1 2-6-4T 13/11/1961 67772 Condemned      
Steam O2 2-8-0 26/11/1961 63928 Transfer in from: 36A Doncaster    
Steam O2 2-8-0 26/11/1961 63941 Transfer in from: 36A Doncaster    
Steam O2 2-8-0 26/11/1961 63942 Transfer in from: 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)    
Steam O2 2-8-0 26/11/1961 63949 Transfer in from: 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)    
Steam L1 2-6-4T 22/01/1962 67774 Condemned      
Steam L1 2-6-4T 23/03/1962 67752 Condemned      
Steam V2 2-6-2 17/06/1962 60814 Transfer in from: 34A Kings Cross    
Steam V2 2-6-2 17/06/1962 60830 Transfer in from: 34E New England    
Steam V2 2-6-2 17/06/1962 60948 Transfer in from: 34E New England    
Steam V2 2-6-2 17/06/1962 60950 Transfer in from: 34A Kings Cross    
Steam V2 2-6-2 17/06/1962 60983 Transfer in from: KX Kings Cross    
Steam A3 4-6-2 17/06/1962 60050 Transfer out to: 34E New England    
Steam A3 4-6-2 17/06/1962 60065 Transfer out to: 34E New England    
Steam L1 2-6-4T w/e 23/06/1962 67798 Transfer out to: 40E Colwick    
Steam O2 2-8-0 09/07/1962 63929 Condemned      
Steam O2 2-8-0 29/07/1962 63922 Transfer in from: 36A Doncaster    
Steam L1 2-6-4T 31/07/1962 67757 Condemned      
Steam A3 4-6-2 09/09/1962 60046 Transfer out to: 34E New England    
Steam A3 4-6-2 09/09/1962 60047 Transfer out to: 34E New England    
Steam A3 4-6-2 09/09/1962 60048 Transfer out to: 34E New England    
Steam V2 2-6-2 23/09/1962 60983 Condemned      
Steam O2 2-8-0 16/10/1962 63948 Condemned      
Steam O2 2-8-0 28/10/1962 63974 Transfer in from: 36A Doncaster    
Steam O2 2-8-0 28/10/1962 63981 Transfer in from: 36A Doncaster    
Steam O2 2-8-0 05/11/1962 63922 Condemned      
Steam L1 2-6-4T 06/11/1962 67796 Condemned      
Steam L1 2-6-4T 14/11/1962 67761 Condemned      
Steam V2 2-6-2 25/11/1962 60948 Transfer out to: 34E New England    
Steam V2 2-6-2 25/11/1962 60950 Transfer out to: 34E New England    
Steam L1 2-6-4T 27/11/1962 67791 Condemned      
Steam O2 2-8-0 09/12/1962 63982 Condemned      
Steam A3 4-6-2 29/12/1962 60049 Condemned      
Steam A3 4-6-2 29/12/1962 60111 Condemned      
Steam O2 2-8-0 29/12/1962 63923 Condemned      
Steam O2 2-8-0 29/12/1962 63930 Condemned      
Steam O2 2-8-0 29/12/1962 63933 Condemned      
Steam L1 2-6-4T 29/12/1962 67773 Condemned      
Steam L1 2-6-4T 29/12/1962 67776 Condemned      
Steam L1 2-6-4T 29/12/1962 67785 Condemned      
Steam O2 2-8-0 30/12/1962 63935 Transfer in from: 36A Doncaster    
Steam O2 2-8-0 30/12/1962 63962 Transfer in from: 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)    
Steam O2 2-8-0 30/12/1962 63968 Transfer in from: 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)    
Steam O2 2-8-0 30/12/1962 63984 Transfer in from: 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)    
Steam O2 2-8-0 30/12/1962 63985 Transfer in from: 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)    
Steam O2 2-8-0 30/12/1962 63987 Transfer in from: 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)    
Steam V2 2-6-2 19/04/1963 60814 Condemned      
Steam A3 4-6-2 21/04/1963 60046 Transfer in from: 34E New England    
Steam A3 4-6-2 21/04/1963 60048 Transfer in from: 34E New England    
Steam A3 4-6-2 13/05/1963 60056 Condemned      
Steam A3 4-6-2 16/06/1963 60061 Transfer in from: 34A Kings Cross    
Steam A3 4-6-2 16/06/1963 60062 Transfer in from: 34E New England    
Steam A3 4-6-2 16/06/1963 60063 Transfer in from: 34A Kings Cross    
Steam A3 4-6-2 16/06/1963 60065 Transfer in from: 34E New England    
Steam A3 4-6-2 16/06/1963 60066 Transfer in from: 34A Kings Cross    
Steam A3 4-6-2 16/06/1963 60107 Transfer in from: 34A Kings Cross    
Steam A3 4-6-2 16/06/1963 60108 Transfer in from: 34E New England    
Steam B1 4-6-0 16/06/1963 61250 Transfer in from: 34E New England    
Steam A3 4-6-2 16/06/1963 60046 Condemned      
Steam A3 4-6-2 16/06/1963 60105 Condemned      
Steam V2 2-6-2 16/06/1963 60830 Condemned      
Steam A3 4-6-2 01/09/1963 60107 Condemned      
Steam O2 2-8-0 03/09/1963 63941 Condemned      
Steam A3 4-6-2 08/09/1963 60054 Transfer out to: 36A Doncaster    
Steam A3 4-6-2 08/09/1963 60062 Transfer out to: 36A Doncaster    
Steam A3 4-6-2 08/09/1963 60063 Transfer out to: 36A Doncaster    
Steam A3 4-6-2 08/09/1963 60065 Transfer out to: 36A Doncaster    
Steam A3 4-6-2 08/09/1963 60106 Transfer out to: 36A Doncaster    
Steam A3 4-6-2 08/09/1963 60108 Transfer out to: 36A Doncaster    
Steam A3 4-6-2 08/09/1963 60112 Transfer out to: 36A Doncaster    
Steam B1 4-6-0 08/09/1963 61250 Transfer out to: 36A Doncaster    
Steam B1 4-6-0 08/09/1963 61251 Transfer out to: 36A Doncaster    
Steam B1 4-6-0 08/09/1963 61367 Transfer out to: 36A Doncaster    
Steam B1 4-6-0 08/09/1963 61389 Transfer out to: 36A Doncaster    
Steam B1 4-6-0 08/09/1963 61392 Transfer out to: 36A Doncaster    
Steam O2 2-8-0 08/09/1963 63931 Transfer out to: 36A Doncaster    
Steam O2 2-8-0 08/09/1963 63932 Transfer out to: 36A Doncaster    
Steam O2 2-8-0 08/09/1963 63940 Transfer out to: 36A Doncaster    
Steam O2 2-8-0 08/09/1963 63943 Transfer out to: 36A Doncaster    
Steam O2 2-8-0 08/09/1963 63962 Transfer out to: 36A Doncaster    
Steam O2 2-8-0 08/09/1963 63968 Transfer out to: 36A Doncaster    
Steam O2 2-8-0 08/09/1963 63974 Transfer out to: 36A Doncaster    
Steam O2 2-8-0 08/09/1963 63981 Transfer out to: 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)    
Steam O2 2-8-0 08/09/1963 63984 Transfer out to: 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)    
Steam O2 2-8-0 08/09/1963 63985 Transfer out to: 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)    
Steam O2 2-8-0 08/09/1963 63987 Transfer out to: 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)    
Steam A3 4-6-2 08/09/1963 60048 Condemned      
Steam A3 4-6-2 08/09/1963 60061 Condemned      
Steam A3 4-6-2 08/09/1963 60066 Condemned      
Steam O2 2-8-0 08/09/1963 63928 Condemned      
Steam O2 2-8-0 08/09/1963 63935 Condemned      
Steam O2 2-8-0 08/09/1963 63938 Condemned      
Steam O2 2-8-0 08/09/1963 63942 Condemned      
Steam O2 2-8-0 08/09/1963 63949 Condemned      
Steam O2 2-8-0 08/09/1963 63956 Condemned      
Steam O2 2-8-0 08/09/1963 63960 Condemned      
Steam O2 2-8-0 08/09/1963 63963 Condemned