Depot: Haymarket
Type | Class | Wheels | Period | Date | Number | Event | Code | Depot | Length of Stay | Notes |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 09/07/1924 | 2563 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 14/07/1924 | 2564 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 16/07/1924 | 2565 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 14/08/1924 | 2566 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 14/08/1924 | 2567 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 18/04/1928 | 2573 | Transfer in from: | GHD | Gateshead | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 05/05/1928 | 2565 | Transfer out to: | GHD | Gateshead | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 05/07/1928 | 2565 | Transfer in from: | GHD | Gateshead | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 05/07/1928 | 2573 | Transfer out to: | GHD | Gateshead | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 24/10/1928 | 2745 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 26/10/1928 | 2745 | Transfer out to: | CAR | Carlisle Canal | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 19/04/1930 | 2795 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 17/05/1930 | 2796 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 04/06/1930 | 2797 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 18/08/1930 | 2566 | Transfer out to: | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 18/08/1930 | 2567 | Transfer out to: | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 06/10/1930 | 2565 | Transfer out to: | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 17/08/1931 | 2565 | Transfer in from: | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 01/12/1931 | 2565 | Transfer out to: | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 10/07/1934 | 2500 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 25/07/1934 | 2502 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | P2 | 2-8-2 | on | 31/07/1934 | 2001 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 27/10/1934 | 2505 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 19/12/1934 | 2506 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 09/02/1935 | 2508 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | P2 | 2-8-2 | on | 21/02/1935 | 2001 | Transfer in from: | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Steam | P2 | 2-8-2 | on | 21/02/1935 | 2001 | Transfer out to: | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 27/04/1935 | 2563 | Transfer out to: | ABD | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | P2 | 2-8-2 | on | 09/06/1935 | 2002 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | P2 | 2-8-2 | on | 22/06/1935 | 2002 | Transfer out to: | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 11/1935 | 9668 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | P2 | 2-8-2 | on | 13/06/1936 | 2003 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | P2 | 2-8-2 | on | 11/07/1936 | 2004 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | P2 | 2-8-2 | on | 04/09/1936 | 2003 | Transfer out to: | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | P2 | 2-8-2 | on | 05/09/1936 | 2006 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | P2 | 2-8-2 | on | 16/11/1936 | 2006 | Transfer out to: | ABD | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 16/11/1936 | 2505 | Transfer out to: | GHD | Gateshead | ||
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | on | 26/12/1936 | 4483 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | on | 23/01/1937 | 4484 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 15/02/1937 | 2564 | Transfer out to: | EFD | Eastfield | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 15/02/1937 | 2797 | Transfer out to: | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | on | 20/02/1937 | 4485 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | on | 13/03/1937 | 4486 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | on | 20/03/1937 | 4487 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | on | 26/03/1937 | 4487 | Transfer out to: | GHD | Gateshead | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 28/03/1937 | 2500 | Transfer out to: | ABD | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 04/04/1937 | 2500 | Transfer in from: | ABD | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 04/04/1937 | 2796 | Transfer out to: | ABD | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 12/04/1937 | 2573 | Transfer in from: | GHD | Gateshead | ||
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | on | 22/06/1937 | 4491 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | on | 29/06/1937 | 4488 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 07/07/1937 | 2744 | Transfer in from: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | on | 08/07/1937 | 4492 | Transfer in from: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | on | 08/07/1937 | 4483 | Transfer out to: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 14/08/1937 | 2750 | Transfer in from: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 08/09/1937 | 2750 | Transfer out to: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 11/09/1937 | 2578 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 08/10/1937 | 2599 | Transfer in from: | GHD | Gateshead | ||
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | on | 08/10/1937 | 4485 | Transfer out to: | GHD | Gateshead | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 16/10/1937 | 2598 | Transfer in from: | GHD | Gateshead | ||
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | on | 02/11/1937 | 4497 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | on | 14/01/1938 | 4483 | Transfer in from: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | on | 22/01/1938 | 4485 | Transfer in from: | GHD | Gateshead | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 23/01/1938 | 2599 | Transfer out to: | GHD | Gateshead | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 29/01/1938 | 2752 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 31/01/1938 | 2578 | Transfer out to: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 08/02/1938 | 2598 | Transfer out to: | GHD | Gateshead | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 08/02/1938 | 2752 | Transfer out to: | STM | St Margarets | ||
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | on | 21/02/1938 | 4487 | Transfer in from: | GHD | Gateshead | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 21/02/1938 | 2573 | Transfer out to: | GHD | Gateshead | ||
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | on | 25/02/1938 | 4482 | Transfer in from: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 06/03/1938 | 2796 | Transfer in from: | ABD | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 06/03/1938 | 2502 | Transfer out to: | STM | St Margarets | ||
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | on | 19/03/1938 | 4490 | Transfer in from: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | on | 19/03/1938 | 4492 | Transfer out to: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 31/03/1938 | 2744 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 19/07/1938 | 2796 | Transfer out to: | EFD | Eastfield | ||
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | on | 04/03/1939 | 4484 | Transfer out to: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 09/03/1939 | 2556 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 09/03/1939 | 2598 | Transfer in from: | GHD | Gateshead | ||
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | on | 09/03/1939 | 4485 | Transfer out to: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | on | 09/03/1939 | 4487 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 15/03/1939 | 2502 | Transfer in from: | STM | St Margarets | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 15/03/1939 | 2556 | Transfer out to: | STM | St Margarets | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 16/03/1939 | 2747 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | on | 16/03/1939 | 4483 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | on | 27/03/1939 | 4487 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | on | 09/05/1939 | 4483 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | on | 09/05/1939 | 4487 | Transfer out to: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 12/01/1940 | 2795 | Transfer out to: | STM | St Margarets | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 20/07/1940 | 2598 | Transfer out to: | ABD | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 09/10/1940 | 2797 | Transfer in from: | STM | St Margarets | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 19/10/1940 | 2795 | Transfer in from: | STM | St Margarets | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 26/11/1940 | 2566 | Transfer in from: | STM | St Margarets | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 04/12/1940 | 2556 | Transfer in from: | EFD | Eastfield | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 04/12/1940 | 2563 | Transfer in from: | EFD | Eastfield | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 14/12/1940 | 2796 | Transfer in from: | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 23/01/1941 | 2747 | Transfer out to: | CAR | Carlisle Canal | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 12/02/1941 | 2565 | Transfer in from: | CAR | Carlisle Canal | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | m/e | 05/1941 | 4787 | Transfer in from: | STM | St Margarets | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | m/e | 05/1941 | 4807 | Transfer in from: | STM | St Margarets | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | m/e | 05/1941 | 4815 | Transfer in from: | STM | St Margarets | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | m/e | 05/1941 | 4819 | Transfer in from: | STM | St Margarets | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | m/e | 05/1941 | 4853 | Transfer in from: | STM | St Margarets | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | m/e | 05/1941 | 4865 | Transfer in from: | STM | St Margarets | ||
Steam | V4 | 2-6-2 | on | 05/05/1941 | 3401 | Transfer in from: | YK | York (North) | ||
Steam | V4 | 2-6-2 | on | 08/06/1941 | 3401 | Transfer in from: | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Steam | V4 | 2-6-2 | on | 08/06/1941 | 3401 | Transfer out to: | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Steam | V4 | 2-6-2 | on | 15/06/1941 | 3401 | Transfer in from: | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Steam | V4 | 2-6-2 | on | 15/06/1941 | 3401 | Transfer out to: | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Steam | V4 | 2-6-2 | on | 21/06/1941 | 3401 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | on | 24/07/1941 | 4462 | Transfer in from: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | on | 01/08/1941 | 4482 | Transfer out to: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | m/e | 10/1941 | 4807 | Transfer out to: | ABD | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 18/10/1941 | 2598 | Transfer in from: | ABD | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | m/e | 11/1941 | 4807 | Transfer in from: | ABD | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | m/e | 11/1941 | 4787 | Transfer out to: | ABD | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | m/e | 12/1941 | 3658 | Transfer in from: | ABD | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 01/12/1941 | 2564 | Transfer in from: | CAR | Carlisle Canal | ||
Steam | V4 | 2-6-2 | on | 24/02/1942 | 3401 | Transfer in from: | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 07/07/1942 | 3653 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | m/e | 08/1942 | 4807 | Transfer out to: | ABD | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 26/08/1942 | 3665 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 22/09/1942 | 3667 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | P2 | 2-8-2 | on | 23/10/1942 | 2003 | Transfer in from: | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | P2 | 2-8-2 | on | 23/10/1942 | 2006 | Transfer in from: | ABD | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | P2 | 2-8-2 | on | 27/11/1942 | 2003 | Transfer out to: | 91N | To North Eastern Region | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 07/03/1943 | 2556 | Transfer out to: | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 03/04/1943 | 2005 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 17/04/1943 | 3670 | Transfer in from: | STM | St Margarets | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 17/04/1943 | 4787 | Transfer in from: | STM | St Margarets | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 17/04/1943 | 4805 | Transfer in from: | STM | St Margarets | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 17/04/1943 | 4807 | Transfer in from: | STM | St Margarets | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 24/04/1943 | 2556 | Transfer in from: | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 27/04/1943 | 3685 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 02/05/1943 | 4819 | Transfer out to: | ABD | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 12/05/1943 | 3682 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | m/e | 07/1943 | 3685 | Transfer out to: | ABD | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | V4 | 2-6-2 | on | 23/10/1943 | 3401 | Transfer out to: | EFD | Eastfield | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 21/11/1943 | 8303 | Transfer in from: | DAR | Darlington | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 12/12/1943 | 4815 | Transfer out to: | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 04/03/1944 | 8303 | Transfer out to: | PTH | Perth (LNER) | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 10/03/1944 | 3692 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | P2 | 2-8-2 | on | 20/03/1944 | 2003 | Transfer in from: | 91N | To North Eastern Region | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 15/05/1944 | 8308 | Transfer in from: | DAR | Darlington | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | m/e | 07/1944 | 3658 | Transfer out to: | ABD | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | m/e | 07/1944 | 4787 | Transfer out to: | ABD | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 29/10/1944 | 3658 | Transfer in from: | ABD | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 29/10/1944 | 4787 | Transfer in from: | ABD | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 29/10/1944 | 4819 | Transfer in from: | ABD | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | P2 | 2-8-2 | on | 29/10/1944 | 2001 | Transfer out to: | ABD | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 05/11/1944 | 3682 | Transfer out to: | EFD | Eastfield | ||
Steam | P2 | 2-8-2 | on | 17/12/1944 | 2003 | Transfer out to: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 14/03/1945 | 3698 | Transfer in from: | DAR | Darlington | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 20/03/1945 | 2003 | Transfer in from: | GHD | Gateshead | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 11/04/1945 | 256l | Transfer in from: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 11/04/1945 | 2003 | Transfer out to: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 13/05/1945 | 2003 | Transfer in from: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 22/05/1945 | 256l | Transfer out to: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 20/08/1945 | 3684 | Transfer in from: | EFD | Eastfield | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 13/10/1945 | 4898 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 17/09/1946 | 1076 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 21/09/1946 | 1072 | Transfer in from: | EFD | Eastfield | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 03/10/1946 | 1081 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 01/02/1947 | 519 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 23/06/1947 | 1178 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | A1/1 | 4-6-2 | on | 02/09/1947 | 113 | Transfer in from: | GHD | Gateshead | ||
Steam | A1/1 | 4-6-2 | on | 13/09/1947 | 113 | Transfer out to: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 10/10/1947 | 1221 | Transfer in from: | CAR | Carlisle Canal | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 20/10/1947 | 1244 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 20/10/1947 | 1245 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 29/12/1947 | 94 | Transfer in from: | CAR | Carlisle Canal | ||
Steam | D1 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2214 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D29 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2413 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D30 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2437 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Large/Scottish Director | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2677 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Large/Scottish Director | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2678 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Large/Scottish Director | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2679 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Large/Scottish Director | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2683 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Large/Scottish Director | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2685 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Large/Scottish Director | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2690 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Large/Scottish Director | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2691 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Large/Scottish Director | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2692 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Large/Scottish Director | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2693 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Large/Scottish Director | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2694 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2705 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2706 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2709 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2711 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2712 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2719 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2721 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2733 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5240 | Snapshot | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5240 | Snapshot | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5243 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D29 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 62403 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7610 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7615 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7620 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J88 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8328 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J88 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8339 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J83 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8457 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J83 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8460 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J83 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8473 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J83 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8478 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J83 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8481 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9169 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9220 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | w/e | 03/01/1948 | 94 | Transfer in from: | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | w/e | 03/01/1948 | 94 | Transfer out to: | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 21/02/1948 | 529 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | D29 | 4-4-0 | on | 02/03/1948 | 62403 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 08/03/1948 | 955 | Transfer out to: | ABD | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | w/e | 27/03/1948 | 2712 | Transfer out to: | STM | St Margarets | ||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | w/e | 27/03/1948 | 2721 | Transfer out to: | STM | St Margarets | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 28/03/1948 | 1292 | Transfer in from: | THJ | Thornton Junction | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 28/03/1948 | 1072 | Transfer out to: | THJ | Thornton Junction | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 03/04/1948 | 1292 | Transfer in from: | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 03/04/1948 | 1292 | Transfer out to: | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 17/05/1948 | 503 | Transfer out to: | ABD | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 26/05/1948 | 503 | Transfer in from: | ABD | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 28/06/1948 | 1007 | Transfer out to: | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 25/07/1948 | 1007 | Transfer in from: | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 25/07/1948 | 61292 | Transfer out to: | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 31/07/1948 | 1007 | Transfer in from: | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 31/07/1948 | 1007 | Transfer out to: | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 29/08/1948 | 1025 | Transfer in from: | TWD | Tweedmouth | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 29/08/1948 | 61019 | Transfer in from: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 29/08/1948 | 61333 | Transfer in from: | CAM | Cambridge | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 29/08/1948 | 61335 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 04/09/1948 | 1025 | Transfer in from: | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 04/09/1948 | 61019 | Transfer in from: | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 04/09/1948 | 61333 | Transfer in from: | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 04/09/1948 | 61335 | Transfer in from: | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 04/09/1948 | 1025 | Transfer out to: | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 04/09/1948 | 61019 | Transfer out to: | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 04/09/1948 | 61333 | Transfer out to: | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 04/09/1948 | 61335 | Transfer out to: | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Steam | D1 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 02/10/1948 | 2214 | Transfer out to: | HAW | Hawick | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 31/10/1948 | 1025 | Transfer out to: | TWD | Tweedmouth | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 31/10/1948 | 61019 | Transfer out to: | DAR | Darlington | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 08/11/1948 | 61335 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 15/11/1948 | 61333 | Transfer out to: | CAM | Cambridge | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 12/12/1948 | 958 | Transfer out to: | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 01/03/1949 | 60510 | Transfer in from: | DAR | Darlington | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 06/03/1949 | 60959 | Transfer in from: | STM | St Margarets | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | w/e | 12/03/1949 | 60959 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | w/e | 12/03/1949 | 60959 | Transfer out to: | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | w/e | 26/03/1949 | 62711 | Transfer out to: | STM | St Margarets | ||
Steam | P2 | 2-8-2 | on | 08/04/1949 | 60506 | Transfer out to: | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 15/05/1949 | 60506 | Transfer in from: | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 08/07/1949 | 60152 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 04/09/1949 | 60501 | Transfer in from: | ABD | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 04/09/1949 | 60502 | Transfer in from: | ABD | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 04/09/1949 | 60509 | Transfer out to: | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 04/09/1949 | 60510 | Transfer out to: | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 25/09/1949 | 60509 | Transfer in from: | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 25/09/1949 | 60510 | Transfer in from: | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 25/09/1949 | 60836 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 25/09/1949 | 60953 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | D29 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 62405 | Transfer in from: | STM | St Margarets | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 20/11/1949 | 60536 | Transfer in from: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 20/11/1949 | 60506 | Transfer out to: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 24/11/1949 | 60159 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | w/e | 26/11/1949 | 60536 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | w/e | 26/11/1949 | 60536 | Transfer out to: | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 27/11/1949 | 60532 | Transfer in from: | YK | York (North) | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 27/11/1949 | 60534 | Transfer in from: | YK | York (North) | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 27/11/1949 | 60535 | Transfer in from: | YK | York (North) | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 27/11/1949 | 60501 | Transfer out to: | YK | York (North) | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 27/11/1949 | 60502 | Transfer out to: | YK | York (North) | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 27/11/1949 | 60503 | Transfer out to: | YK | York (North) | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 02/12/1949 | 60160 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | w/e | 03/12/1949 | 60532 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | w/e | 03/12/1949 | 60534 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | w/e | 03/12/1949 | 60535 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | w/e | 03/12/1949 | 60532 | Transfer out to: | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | w/e | 03/12/1949 | 60534 | Transfer out to: | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | w/e | 03/12/1949 | 60535 | Transfer out to: | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 11/12/1949 | 60848 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 11/12/1949 | 60894 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 15/12/1949 | 60507 | Transfer in from: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 19/12/1949 | 60161 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 23/12/1949 | 60162 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 30/12/1949 | 60505 | Transfer out to: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 08/01/1950 | 60931 | Transfer out to: | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 08/01/1950 | 60980 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 09/01/1950 | 60530 | Transfer in from: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | P2 | 2-8-2 | on | 09/01/1950 | 60504 | Transfer out to: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 02/07/1950 | 60090 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 02/07/1950 | 60096 | Transfer in from: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 02/07/1950 | 60097 | Transfer in from: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 02/07/1950 | 60064 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 02/07/1950 | 60065 | Transfer out to: | 34A | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 02/07/1950 | 60067 | Transfer out to: | 34A | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 06/08/1950 | 60098 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 06/08/1950 | 60066 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | D29 | 4-4-0 | on | 26/08/1950 | 62413 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 12/11/1950 | 61404 | Transfer in from: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 12/11/1950 | 60834 | Transfer out to: | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 61404 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 61404 | Transfer out to: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1951 | 62743 | Transfer in from: | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 07/01/1951 | 60537 | Transfer in from: | ABD | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 07/01/1951 | 60532 | Transfer out to: | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 14/01/1951 | 60836 | Transfer in from: | STM | St Margarets | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 14/01/1951 | 60894 | Transfer in from: | STM | St Margarets | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 14/01/1951 | 60980 | Transfer in from: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 14/01/1951 | 60152 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 14/01/1951 | 60160 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 14/01/1951 | 60161 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 14/01/1951 | 60972 | Transfer out to: | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 20/01/1951 | 62743 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 20/01/1951 | 62743 | Transfer out to: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 60537 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 60836 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 60894 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 60980 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 60537 | Transfer out to: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 60836 | Transfer out to: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 60894 | Transfer out to: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 60980 | Transfer out to: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 18/02/1951 | 60089 | Transfer in from: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | D29 | 4-4-0 | on | 22/02/1951 | 62405 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 04/03/1951 | 60160 | Transfer in from: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 04/03/1951 | 60836 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 11/03/1951 | 60152 | Transfer in from: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 11/03/1951 | 60161 | Transfer in from: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 11/03/1951 | 60882 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 11/03/1951 | 60894 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 11/03/1951 | 60980 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | m/e | 31/03/1951 | 60152 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | m/e | 31/03/1951 | 60160 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | m/e | 31/03/1951 | 60161 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | m/e | 31/03/1951 | 60152 | Transfer out to: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | m/e | 31/03/1951 | 60160 | Transfer out to: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | m/e | 31/03/1951 | 60161 | Transfer out to: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 16/04/1951 | 60160 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 16/09/1951 | 60161 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 22/02/1952 | 60160 | Transfer in from: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 60160 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 60160 | Transfer out to: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | on | 06/05/1952 | 65240 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 65235 | Transfer in from: | BGT | Bathgate | ||
Steam | Large/Scottish Director | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 62677 | Transfer in from: | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Steam | Large/Scottish Director | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 62677 | Transfer out to: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 28/12/1952 | 60152 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | Large/Scottish Director | 4-4-0 | 8w/e | 21/03/1953 | 62692 | Transfer out to: | 64F | Bathgate | ||
Steam | Large/Scottish Director | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 13/06/1953 | 62692 | Transfer in from: | 64F | Bathgate | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 29/06/1953 | 60152 | Transfer in from: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 29/06/1953 | 60161 | Transfer in from: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 06/01/1954 | 60097 | Transfer out to: | 68E | Carlisle Canal | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 07/02/1954 | 60037 | Transfer out to: | 68E | Carlisle Canal | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 21/02/1954 | 60097 | Transfer in from: | 68E | Carlisle Canal | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 08/03/1954 | 60037 | Transfer in from: | 68E | Carlisle Canal | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 27/09/1954 | 61355 | Transfer in from: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 14/05/1955 | 69173 | Transfer in from: | STM | St Margarets | ||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 06/08/1955 | 69173 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | D30 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 02/09/1955 | 62437 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | J83 | 0-6-0T | on | 26/05/1956 | 68473 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 21/03/1957 | 61260 | Transfer in from: | EFD | Eastfield | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 21/03/1957 | 61261 | Transfer in from: | EFD | Eastfield | ||
Steam | Large/Scottish Director | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 11/05/1957 | 62677 | Transfer out to: | 62A | Thornton Junction | ||
Steam | Large/Scottish Director | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 11/05/1957 | 62678 | Transfer out to: | 62A | Thornton Junction | ||
Steam | Large/Scottish Director | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 11/05/1957 | 62679 | Transfer out to: | 62A | Thornton Junction | ||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 11/05/1957 | 62706 | Transfer out to: | 62A | Thornton Junction | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 21/10/1957 | 61333 | Transfer in from: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | Std 6P | 4-6-2 | 3w/e | 26/10/1957 | 72000 | Transfer in from: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | Std 6P | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 26/10/1957 | 72002 | Transfer in from: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | Std 6P | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 26/10/1957 | 72005 | Transfer in from: | 68A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | Std 6P | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 26/10/1957 | 72006 | Transfer in from: | 68A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 28/10/1957 | 60816 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 28/10/1957 | 60927 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 28/10/1957 | 60951 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 28/10/1957 | 60959 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 09/12/1957 | 61219 | Transfer in from: | 68E | Carlisle Canal | ||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 15/02/1958 | 62733 | Transfer out to: | 62A | Thornton Junction | ||
Steam | J88 | 0-6-0T | on | 03/03/1958 | 68328 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Std 6P | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 19/04/1958 | 72005 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | Std 6P | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 19/04/1958 | 72006 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 21/04/1958 | 60816 | Transfer in from: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 21/04/1958 | 60927 | Transfer in from: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 21/04/1958 | 60951 | Transfer in from: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 21/04/1958 | 60959 | Transfer in from: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | Std 6P | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 10/05/1958 | 72000 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | Std 6P | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 10/05/1958 | 72002 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | Large/Scottish Director | 4-4-0 | on | 17/09/1958 | 62683 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J88 | 0-6-0T | on | 21/10/1958 | 68339 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J83 | 0-6-0T | on | 06/11/1958 | 68460 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 14/11/1958 | D3560 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | on | 18/11/1958 | 69220 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 21/11/1958 | D3561 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | J83 | 0-6-0T | on | 24/11/1958 | 68478 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 439 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 20/12/1958 | 55165 | Transfer in from: | 28B | Dalry Road | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 01/01/1959 | 60819 | Transfer in from: | ABD | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 01/01/1959 | 60824 | Transfer in from: | ABD | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 01/01/1959 | 60827 | Transfer in from: | ABD | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 01/01/1959 | 819 | Transfer in from: | ABD | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 19/01/1959 | 61404 | Transfer out to: | 65B | St Rollox (Balornock) | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 22/01/1959 | 60920 | Transfer in from: | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 24/01/1959 | 61355 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 26/01/1959 | 61261 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 26/01/1959 | 61333 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | on | 09/02/1959 | 69169 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 14/03/1959 | 69211 | Transfer in from: | THJ | Thornton Junction | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | on | 17/04/1959 | D5321 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | on | 24/04/1959 | D5322 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/05/1959 | D3736 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | on | 01/05/1959 | D5323 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | on | 08/05/1959 | D5324 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 09/05/1959 | D5320 | Transfer in from: | Leith | |||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | on | 14/05/1959 | D5325 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | on | 22/05/1959 | D5326 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | on | 06/06/1959 | D5327 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | on | 12/06/1959 | D5328 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | on | 12/06/1959 | D5329 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | on | 19/06/1959 | D5330 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | on | 26/06/1959 | D5331 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | on | 02/07/1959 | D5332 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 439 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 04/07/1959 | 55165 | Transfer out to: | 64C | Dalry Road | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | on | 10/07/1959 | D5333 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | on | 17/07/1959 | D5334 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | on | 24/07/1959 | D5335 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 25/07/1959 | D5330 | Transfer out to: | 34B | Hornsey | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 25/07/1959 | D5331 | Transfer out to: | 34B | Hornsey | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 25/07/1959 | D5332 | Transfer out to: | 34B | Hornsey | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 25/07/1959 | D5333 | Transfer out to: | 34B | Hornsey | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 01/08/1959 | D5334 | Transfer out to: | 34B | Hornsey | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 01/08/1959 | D5335 | Transfer out to: | 34B | Hornsey | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | on | 14/08/1959 | D5336 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | on | 20/08/1959 | D5337 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | on | 28/08/1959 | D5338 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | on | 04/09/1959 | D5339 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | on | 11/09/1959 | D5340 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | on | 18/09/1959 | D5341 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | on | 25/09/1959 | D5342 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 26/09/1959 | D5330 | Transfer in from: | 34B | Hornsey | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 26/09/1959 | D5331 | Transfer in from: | 34B | Hornsey | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | on | 02/10/1959 | D5343 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 03/10/1959 | D5332 | Transfer in from: | 34B | Hornsey | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 03/10/1959 | D5333 | Transfer in from: | 34B | Hornsey | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 03/10/1959 | D5334 | Transfer in from: | 34B | Hornsey | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 03/10/1959 | D5335 | Transfer in from: | 34B | Hornsey | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | on | 09/10/1959 | D5344 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | on | 23/10/1959 | D5345 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | on | 30/10/1959 | D5346 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 10/11/1959 | 60816 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 10/11/1959 | 60819 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 10/11/1959 | 60824 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 10/11/1959 | 60827 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 10/11/1959 | 60920 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 10/11/1959 | 819 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | Large/Scottish Director | 4-4-0 | on | 16/11/1959 | 62692 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Large/Scottish Director | 4-4-0 | on | 16/11/1959 | 62694 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Std 6P | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 21/11/1959 | 72001 | Transfer in from: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | Std 6P | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 21/11/1959 | 72002 | Transfer in from: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 21/11/1959 | 62719 | Transfer out to: | 64G | Hawick | ||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | on | 30/11/1959 | 62705 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J88 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 19/12/1959 | 68335 | Transfer in from: | THJ | Thornton Junction | ||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1960 | 62709 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 13/02/1960 | D256 | Transfer in from: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 13/02/1960 | D257 | Transfer in from: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 13/02/1960 | D258 | Transfer in from: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 13/02/1960 | D259 | Transfer in from: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 13/02/1960 | D5346 | Transfer out to: | 60A | Inverness | ||
Steam | Large/Scottish Director | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 13/02/1960 | 62693 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 19/02/1960 | D260 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 26/02/1960 | D261 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 04/03/1960 | D262 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 07/03/1960 | D263 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 11/03/1960 | D264 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | J83 | 0-6-0T | on | 11/03/1960 | 68457 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/03/1960 | D3738 | Transfer in from: | 64C | Dalry Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/03/1960 | D3739 | Transfer in from: | 64C | Dalry Road | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 12/03/1960 | D258 | Transfer out to: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 12/03/1960 | D259 | Transfer out to: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/03/1960 | D3560 | Transfer out to: | 64C | Dalry Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/03/1960 | D3561 | Transfer out to: | 64C | Dalry Road | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 12/03/1960 | D5338 | Transfer out to: | 60A | Inverness | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 12/03/1960 | D5339 | Transfer out to: | 60A | Inverness | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 12/03/1960 | D5340 | Transfer out to: | 60A | Inverness | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 12/03/1960 | D5341 | Transfer out to: | 60A | Inverness | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 12/03/1960 | D5342 | Transfer out to: | 60A | Inverness | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 12/03/1960 | D5343 | Transfer out to: | 60A | Inverness | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 12/03/1960 | D5344 | Transfer out to: | 60A | Inverness | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 12/03/1960 | D5345 | Transfer out to: | 60A | Inverness | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 14/03/1960 | D265 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 19/03/1960 | D257 | Transfer out to: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 21/03/1960 | D266 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 26/03/1960 | D256 | Transfer out to: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 09/04/1960 | D5344 | Transfer in from: | 60A | Inverness | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 09/04/1960 | D5345 | Transfer in from: | 60A | Inverness | ||
Steam | Std 6P | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 09/04/1960 | 72001 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | Std 6P | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 09/04/1960 | 72002 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 11/04/1960 | 60927 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 11/04/1960 | 60951 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 11/04/1960 | 60959 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | on | 15/04/1960 | D2752 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 18/04/1960 | 61260 | Transfer out to: | 64C | Dalry Road | ||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | on | 21/04/1960 | D2753 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 23/04/1960 | D5300 | Transfer in from: | 34B | Hornsey | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 23/04/1960 | D5301 | Transfer in from: | 34B | Hornsey | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 30/04/1960 | D5302 | Transfer in from: | 34B | Hornsey | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 30/04/1960 | D5303 | Transfer in from: | 34B | Hornsey | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 07/05/1960 | D5304 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 07/05/1960 | D5305 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | on | 09/05/1960 | 62743 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 14/05/1960 | D5307 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 14/05/1960 | D5308 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 21/05/1960 | D5309 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 28/05/1960 | D5306 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 28/05/1960 | D5310 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 04/06/1960 | D5307 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 04/06/1960 | D5308 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 04/06/1960 | D5309 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 04/06/1960 | D5312 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 04/06/1960 | D5313 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/06/1960 | D3736 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 04/06/1960 | D5307 | Transfer out to: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 04/06/1960 | D5308 | Transfer out to: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 04/06/1960 | D5309 | Transfer out to: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 25/06/1960 | D5314 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 25/06/1960 | D5315 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 30/06/1960 | 61007 | Transfer out to: | 64C | Dalry Road | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 30/06/1960 | 61244 | Transfer out to: | 64C | Dalry Road | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 02/07/1960 | D5316 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 02/07/1960 | D5317 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Steam | Large/Scottish Director | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 02/07/1960 | 62693 | Transfer in from: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 02/07/1960 | D5320 | Transfer out to: | 60A | Inverness | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 02/07/1960 | D5321 | Transfer out to: | 60A | Inverness | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 02/07/1960 | D5322 | Transfer out to: | 60A | Inverness | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 02/07/1960 | D5323 | Transfer out to: | 60A | Inverness | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 02/07/1960 | D5324 | Transfer out to: | 60A | Inverness | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 02/07/1960 | D5325 | Transfer out to: | 60A | Inverness | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 02/07/1960 | D5328 | Transfer out to: | 60A | Inverness | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 02/07/1960 | D5333 | Transfer out to: | 60A | Inverness | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 02/07/1960 | D5335 | Transfer out to: | 60A | Inverness | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 02/07/1960 | D5337 | Transfer out to: | 60A | Inverness | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 02/07/1960 | D5344 | Transfer out to: | 60A | Inverness | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 02/07/1960 | D5345 | Transfer out to: | 60A | Inverness | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 13/07/1960 | 60041 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 13/07/1960 | 60087 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 13/07/1960 | 60507 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 13/07/1960 | 60510 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 30/07/1960 | D5330 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 30/07/1960 | D5331 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 30/07/1960 | D5334 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 15/08/1960 | 60509 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 01/10/1960 | D5318 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 01/10/1960 | D5319 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 22/10/1960 | D5311 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 19/11/1960 | D5326 | Transfer out to: | 60A | Inverness | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 19/11/1960 | D5329 | Transfer out to: | 60A | Inverness | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 19/11/1960 | D5336 | Transfer out to: | 60A | Inverness | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 21/11/1960 | 60089 | Transfer out to: | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 21/11/1960 | 60090 | Transfer out to: | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 28/11/1960 | 60087 | Transfer in from: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Diesel | 55 | Co-Co | on | 28/02/1961 | D9000 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/03/1961 | 45355 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 23/04/1961 | 60035 | Transfer out to: | 12C | Carlisle Canal | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 23/04/1961 | 60057 | Transfer out to: | 12C | Carlisle Canal | ||
Diesel | 55 | Co-Co | on | 10/05/1961 | D9004 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 15/05/1961 | 60057 | Transfer in from: | 12C | Carlisle Canal | ||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | on | 21/06/1961 | 67610 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 55 | Co-Co | on | 29/06/1961 | D9006 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Large/Scottish Director | 4-4-0 | on | 13/07/1961 | 62690 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 55 | Co-Co | on | 21/07/1961 | D9010 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 28/08/1961 | 60035 | Transfer in from: | 12C | Carlisle Canal | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 30/08/1961 | D357 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | on | 04/09/1961 | D2751 | Transfer in from: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 04/09/1961 | 60035 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 06/09/1961 | D358 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 13/09/1961 | D359 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 55 | Co-Co | on | 14/09/1961 | D9013 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 20/09/1961 | D360 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 03/10/1961 | D361 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 11/10/1961 | D362 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 16/10/1961 | 60519 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 16/10/1961 | 60529 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 16/10/1961 | 60530 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 16/10/1961 | 60535 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 18/10/1961 | D363 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 25/10/1961 | D364 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | on | 25/10/1961 | 65235 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 55 | Co-Co | on | 27/10/1961 | D9016 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 01/11/1961 | D365 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 06/11/1961 | 60037 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 06/11/1961 | 60043 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 13/11/1961 | 60534 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 13/11/1961 | 60536 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 13/11/1961 | 60537 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 18/11/1961 | D366 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Large/Scottish Director | 4-4-0 | on | 20/11/1961 | 62691 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Large/Scottish Director | 4-4-0 | on | 20/11/1961 | 62693 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 22/11/1961 | D367 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 01/12/1961 | D368 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 03/12/1961 | 60087 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Diesel | 55 | Co-Co | on | 11/12/1961 | D9019 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 13/12/1961 | 60057 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 13/12/1961 | 60094 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 13/12/1961 | 60096 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 13/12/1961 | 60097 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | Large/Scottish Director | 4-4-0 | on | 15/01/1962 | 62685 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 03/02/1962 | D153 | Transfer in from: | 17A | Derby | ||
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | on | 03/02/1962 | 60031 | Transfer out to: | 65B | St Rollox (Balornock) | ||
Steam | J83 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 12/02/1962 | 68481 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 55 | Co-Co | on | 16/03/1962 | D9021 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | 4w/e | 21/04/1962 | D153 | Transfer out to: | 65B | St Rollox (Balornock) | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 21/04/1962 | D5318 | Transfer out to: | 60A | Inverness | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 21/04/1962 | D5319 | Transfer out to: | 60A | Inverness | ||
Steam | J88 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 21/04/1962 | 68335 | Transfer out to: | 65D | Dawsholm | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 14/05/1962 | 60536 | Transfer in from: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | on | 20/05/1962 | 60009 | Transfer out to: | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | on | 20/05/1962 | 60027 | Transfer out to: | 65B | St Rollox (Balornock) | ||
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | on | 11/06/1962 | 60004 | Transfer out to: | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | on | 11/06/1962 | 60011 | Transfer out to: | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | on | 20/09/1962 | 60004 | Transfer in from: | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 23/09/1962 | 61076 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 23/09/1962 | 61219 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 01/10/1962 | 69211 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 08/10/1962 | 60536 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | w/e | 08/12/1962 | 67657 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | w/e | 08/12/1962 | 67685 | Transfer in from: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | w/e | 08/12/1962 | 67687 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | w/e | 08/12/1962 | 67688 | Transfer in from: | GHD | Gateshead | ||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | w/e | 08/12/1962 | 67689 | Transfer in from: | GHD | Gateshead | ||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | w/e | 08/12/1962 | 67620 | Transfer out to: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | on | 10/12/1962 | 67685 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 22/12/1962 | 67657 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 22/12/1962 | 67685 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 22/12/1962 | 67687 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 22/12/1962 | 67688 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 22/12/1962 | 67689 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 22/12/1962 | 67657 | Transfer out to: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 22/12/1962 | 67687 | Transfer out to: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 22/12/1962 | 67688 | Transfer out to: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 22/12/1962 | 67689 | Transfer out to: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 29/12/1962 | 45355 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | on | 29/12/1962 | 67615 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | on | 29/12/1962 | 67657 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | on | 29/12/1962 | 67687 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | on | 29/12/1962 | 67688 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | on | 29/12/1962 | 67689 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 06/01/1963 | 60098 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 06/01/1963 | 60099 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 06/01/1963 | 60100 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 06/01/1963 | 60101 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 06/04/1963 | D1510 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 06/04/1963 | D1510 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | on | 17/06/1963 | 60004 | Transfer out to: | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 03/08/1963 | D1527 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | on | 09/09/1963 | 60012 | Transfer out to: | 64C | Dalry Road | ||
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | on | 09/09/1963 | 60024 | Transfer out to: | 64C | Dalry Road | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 09/09/1963 | 60152 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 09/09/1963 | 60159 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 09/09/1963 | 60160 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 09/09/1963 | 60161 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 09/09/1963 | 60162 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 09/09/1963 | 61081 | Transfer out to: | 64C | Dalry Road | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 09/09/1963 | 61178 | Transfer out to: | 64C | Dalry Road | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 09/09/1963 | 61221 | Transfer out to: | 64C | Dalry Road | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 09/09/1963 | 61245 | Transfer out to: | 64C | Dalry Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 14/09/1963 | D1527 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/10/1963 | 65243 | Transfer out to: | 64C | Dalry Road | ||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | on | 24/10/1963 | D8554 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | on | 29/10/1963 | D8555 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | on | 29/10/1963 | D8556 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | on | 08/11/1963 | D8557 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | on | 08/11/1963 | D8558 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | on | 12/11/1963 | D8559 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | on | 12/11/1963 | D8560 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | on | 22/11/1963 | D8561 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | on | 22/11/1963 | D8562 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | on | 20/12/1963 | D8563 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | on | 20/12/1963 | D8564 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | on | 21/12/1963 | D8565 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | on | 21/12/1963 | D8566 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | on | 06/01/1964 | D8567 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | on | 06/01/1964 | D8568 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | on | 10/01/1964 | D8569 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | on | 10/01/1964 | D8570 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | on | 20/01/1964 | D8571 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | on | 20/01/1964 | D8572 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | on | 30/01/1964 | D8573 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | on | 30/01/1964 | D8574 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | on | 12/02/1964 | D8575 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | on | 12/02/1964 | D8576 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | on | 18/02/1964 | D8577 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | on | 03/03/1964 | D8578 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | on | 03/03/1964 | D8579 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | on | 11/03/1964 | D8580 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | on | 24/03/1964 | D8581 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | on | 31/03/1964 | D8582 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | on | 17/04/1964 | D8583 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | on | 14/05/1964 | D8585 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | on | 28/05/1964 | D8584 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | on | 11/12/1964 | D8586 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 55 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/12/1964 | D9021 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | on | 05/02/1965 | D8587 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 55 | Co-Co | w/e | 19/06/1965 | D9021 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 10/07/1965 | D1771 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 16/10/1965 | D1968 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 22/10/1965 | D1969 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 22/10/1965 | D1970 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 23/10/1965 | D1771 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 30/10/1965 | D1971 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 30/10/1965 | D3742 | Transfer in from: | 64C | Dalry Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 30/10/1965 | D3877 | Transfer in from: | 64C | Dalry Road | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 5w/e | 30/10/1965 | D5318 | Transfer in from: | 60A | Inverness | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 5w/e | 30/10/1965 | D5319 | Transfer in from: | 60A | Inverness | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 06/11/1965 | D1972 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 10/11/1965 | D1973 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 13/11/1965 | D1974 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 20/11/1965 | D1975 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 24/11/1965 | D1976 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | 8w/e | 26/03/1966 | D8028 | Transfer in from: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | 8w/e | 26/03/1966 | D8029 | Transfer in from: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | 8w/e | 26/03/1966 | D8030 | Transfer in from: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 28/05/1966 | D8604 | Transfer in from: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 28/05/1966 | D8605 | Transfer in from: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 28/05/1966 | D8606 | Transfer in from: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 28/05/1966 | D8607 | Transfer in from: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 28/05/1966 | D8608 | Transfer in from: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 28/05/1966 | D8609 | Transfer in from: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 28/05/1966 | D8610 | Transfer in from: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 28/05/1966 | D8611 | Transfer in from: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 28/05/1966 | D8612 | Transfer in from: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 28/05/1966 | D8613 | Transfer in from: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 28/05/1966 | D8614 | Transfer in from: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 28/05/1966 | D8615 | Transfer in from: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 28/05/1966 | D8616 | Transfer in from: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 13/08/1966 | D5061 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 13/08/1966 | D5062 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 13/08/1966 | D5064 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 13/08/1966 | D5065 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 13/08/1966 | D5068 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 13/08/1966 | D5069 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 13/08/1966 | D5071 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 13/08/1966 | D5072 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 13/08/1966 | D5095 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 3w/e | 13/08/1966 | D6821 | Transfer in from: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 20/08/1966 | D5066 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 03/09/1966 | D5094 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 24/09/1966 | D3554 | Transfer in from: | 64F | Bathgate | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 24/09/1966 | D3555 | Transfer in from: | 64F | Bathgate | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 24/09/1966 | D3560 | Transfer in from: | 64F | Bathgate | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 24/09/1966 | D3879 | Transfer in from: | 64F | Bathgate | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | 5w/e | 24/09/1966 | D5094 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 5w/e | 24/09/1966 | D6837 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 5w/e | 24/09/1966 | D6838 | Transfer in from: | 88A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 5w/e | 24/09/1966 | D6844 | Transfer in from: | 88A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 5w/e | 24/09/1966 | D6845 | Transfer in from: | 88A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 5w/e | 24/09/1966 | D6846 | Transfer in from: | 88A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 5w/e | 24/09/1966 | D6847 | Transfer in from: | 88A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 5w/e | 24/09/1966 | D6848 | Transfer in from: | 88A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 5w/e | 24/09/1966 | D6849 | Transfer in from: | 88A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 5w/e | 24/09/1966 | D6850 | Transfer in from: | 88A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 5w/e | 24/09/1966 | D6851 | Transfer in from: | 88A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 5w/e | 24/09/1966 | D6858 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | 5w/e | 24/09/1966 | D5094 | Transfer out to: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 24/09/1966 | D5070 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | m/e | 10/1966 | D5067 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 08/10/1966 | D6821 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 05/11/1966 | D5063 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 9w/e | 26/11/1966 | D6857 | Transfer in from: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 9w/e | 26/11/1966 | D6859 | Transfer in from: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | 9w/e | 26/11/1966 | D8032 | Transfer in from: | 60A | Inverness | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 10/12/1966 | D7602 | Transfer in from: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 10/12/1966 | D7603 | Transfer in from: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 10/12/1966 | D7604 | Transfer in from: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 10/12/1966 | D7605 | Transfer in from: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 10/12/1966 | D7606 | Transfer in from: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 10/12/1966 | D7607 | Transfer in from: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 10/12/1966 | D7608 | Transfer in from: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | 5w/e | 31/12/1966 | D5050 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 5w/e | 31/12/1966 | D5318 | Transfer out to: | 60A | Inverness | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 5w/e | 31/12/1966 | D5319 | Transfer out to: | 60A | Inverness | ||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | on | 04/03/1967 | D2752 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/04/1967 | D2587 | Transfer in from: | 51C | West Hartlepool | ||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/04/1967 | D2589 | Transfer in from: | 51C | West Hartlepool | ||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/04/1967 | D2590 | Transfer in from: | 51C | West Hartlepool | ||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/04/1967 | D2592 | Transfer in from: | 51C | West Hartlepool | ||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/04/1967 | D2593 | Transfer in from: | 56G | Bradford Hammerton Street | ||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/04/1967 | D2595 | Transfer in from: | 56G | Bradford Hammerton Street | ||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/04/1967 | D2596 | Transfer in from: | 56G | Bradford Hammerton Street | ||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/04/1967 | D2597 | Transfer in from: | 56G | Bradford Hammerton Street | ||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/04/1967 | D2608 | Transfer in from: | 56G | Bradford Hammerton Street | ||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/04/1967 | D2617 | Transfer in from: | 56G | Bradford Hammerton Street | ||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/04/1967 | D2618 | Transfer in from: | 51C | West Hartlepool | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 5w/e | 29/04/1967 | D5318 | Transfer in from: | 60A | Inverness | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 5w/e | 29/04/1967 | D5319 | Transfer in from: | 60A | Inverness | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 5w/e | 29/04/1967 | D6903 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 13/05/1967 | 12107 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 26/05/1967 | D8316 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/05/1967 | 12107 | Transfer out to: | 62A | Thornton Junction | ||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/05/1967 | D2587 | Transfer out to: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/05/1967 | D2589 | Transfer out to: | 64H | Leith Central | ||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/05/1967 | D2590 | Transfer out to: | 64H | Leith Central | ||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/05/1967 | D2593 | Transfer out to: | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | ||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/05/1967 | D2595 | Transfer out to: | 64H | Leith Central | ||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/05/1967 | D2596 | Transfer out to: | 64H | Leith Central | ||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/05/1967 | D2597 | Transfer out to: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/05/1967 | D2608 | Transfer out to: | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | ||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/05/1967 | D2617 | Transfer out to: | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | ||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/05/1967 | D2618 | Transfer out to: | 64H | Leith Central | ||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 24/06/1967 | D2556 | Transfer in from: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 24/06/1967 | D2559 | Transfer in from: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 24/06/1967 | D8552 | Transfer in from: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 24/06/1967 | D8553 | Transfer in from: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 24/06/1967 | D8028 | Transfer out to: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | 2w/e | 24/06/1967 | D8604 | Transfer out to: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | 2w/e | 24/06/1967 | D8605 | Transfer out to: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | on | 24/06/1967 | D2753 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/07/1967 | D2556 | Transfer out to: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/07/1967 | D2559 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | on | 03/08/1967 | D2751 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/08/1967 | D3878 | Transfer in from: | 64H | Leith Central | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 26/08/1967 | D1975 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 26/08/1967 | D5316 | Transfer out to: | 60A | Inverness | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 26/08/1967 | D5317 | Transfer out to: | 60A | Inverness | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 26/08/1967 | D5318 | Transfer out to: | 60A | Inverness | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 26/08/1967 | D5319 | Transfer out to: | 60A | Inverness | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | 2w/e | 26/08/1967 | D8029 | Transfer out to: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 26/08/1967 | D8552 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 26/08/1967 | D8553 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 26/08/1967 | D8554 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 26/08/1967 | D8555 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 26/08/1967 | D8556 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 26/08/1967 | D8556 | Transfer in from: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | 5w/e | 30/09/1967 | D8031 | Transfer in from: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | 5w/e | 30/09/1967 | D8033 | Transfer in from: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | m/e | 30/09/1967 | D6837 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 5w/e | 30/09/1967 | D6859 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | 5w/e | 30/09/1967 | D8556 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | 5w/e | 30/09/1967 | D8557 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | 5w/e | 30/09/1967 | D8558 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | 5w/e | 30/09/1967 | D8559 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 20/10/1967 | D8323 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 28/10/1967 | D1975 | Transfer in from: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 25/11/1967 | D8317 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 25/11/1967 | D8318 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/11/1967 | D3554 | Transfer out to: | 64H | Leith Central | ||
Diesel | 55 | Co-Co | w/e | 02/12/1967 | D9001 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 55 | Co-Co | w/e | 02/12/1967 | D9003 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 55 | Co-Co | w/e | 02/12/1967 | D9009 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 55 | Co-Co | w/e | 02/12/1967 | D9000 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 55 | Co-Co | w/e | 02/12/1967 | D9016 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 55 | Co-Co | w/e | 02/12/1967 | D9019 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | 5w/e | 30/12/1967 | D8560 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 13/01/1968 | D5050 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 13/01/1968 | D5062 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 13/01/1968 | D5063 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 27/01/1968 | D8319 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 27/01/1968 | D5316 | Transfer in from: | 60A | Inverness | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 27/01/1968 | D5317 | Transfer in from: | 60A | Inverness | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 27/01/1968 | D5318 | Transfer in from: | 60A | Inverness | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 27/01/1968 | D5064 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 27/01/1968 | D8561 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 03/02/1968 | D5061 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 55 | Co-Co | w/e | 04/02/1968 | D9013 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 55 | Co-Co | w/e | 04/02/1968 | D9013 | Transfer out to: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 06 | 0-4-0 | 4w/e | 24/02/1968 | D2435 | Transfer in from: | 65F | Grangemouth | ||
Diesel | 06 | 0-4-0 | 4w/e | 24/02/1968 | D2443 | Transfer in from: | 67C | Ayr | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 24/02/1968 | D8323 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Diesel | 55 | Co-Co | w/e | 25/02/1968 | D9012 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 55 | Co-Co | w/e | 25/02/1968 | D9013 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 02/03/1968 | D6700 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | on | 02/03/1968 | D2592 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | 5w/e | 30/03/1968 | D368 | Transfer out to: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | 5w/e | 30/03/1968 | D5065 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | 5w/e | 30/03/1968 | D5066 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | 5w/e | 30/03/1968 | D8562 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | 5w/e | 30/03/1968 | D8563 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 20/04/1968 | D6700 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | 4w/e | 27/04/1968 | D368 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | 5w/e | 01/06/1968 | D8316 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | 5w/e | 01/06/1968 | D8317 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | 5w/e | 01/06/1968 | D8318 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | 5w/e | 01/06/1968 | D8319 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | 5w/e | 01/06/1968 | D8564 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | 5w/e | 01/06/1968 | D8565 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | 5w/e | 01/06/1968 | D8566 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | 5w/e | 01/06/1968 | D8567 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 08/06/1968 | D8030 | Transfer out to: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 08/06/1968 | D8031 | Transfer out to: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 08/06/1968 | D8033 | Transfer out to: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 55 | Co-Co | w/e | 22/06/1968 | D9001 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 55 | Co-Co | w/e | 22/06/1968 | D9003 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 55 | Co-Co | w/e | 22/06/1968 | D9009 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 55 | Co-Co | w/e | 22/06/1968 | D9012 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 3w/e | 29/06/1968 | D6937 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 55 | Co-Co | 3w/e | 29/06/1968 | D9000 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 55 | Co-Co | 3w/e | 29/06/1968 | D9013 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 55 | Co-Co | 3w/e | 29/06/1968 | D9016 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 55 | Co-Co | 3w/e | 29/06/1968 | D9019 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 3w/e | 29/06/1968 | D3560 | Transfer out to: | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | 3w/e | 29/06/1968 | D363 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 06/07/1968 | D8032 | Transfer out to: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 06 | 0-4-0 | 3w/e | 27/07/1968 | D2435 | Transfer out to: | 64H | Leith Central | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 28/09/1968 | D6919 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 28/09/1968 | D6936 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 28/09/1968 | D6838 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 28/09/1968 | D6845 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 28/09/1968 | D8568 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 28/09/1968 | D8569 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 28/09/1968 | D8570 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/10/1968 | D1573 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/10/1968 | D1577 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/10/1968 | D1578 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/10/1968 | D1580 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/10/1968 | D1581 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 12/10/1968 | D8502 | Transfer in from: | D10 | Preston Division | ||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 12/10/1968 | D8515 | Transfer in from: | D10 | Preston Division | ||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 12/10/1968 | D8525 | Transfer in from: | D10 | Preston Division | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/10/1968 | D1969 | Transfer out to: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/10/1968 | D1970 | Transfer out to: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/10/1968 | D1971 | Transfer out to: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/10/1968 | D1972 | Transfer out to: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/10/1968 | D1973 | Transfer out to: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | on | 13/10/1968 | D8609 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | on | 13/10/1968 | D8611 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 26/10/1968 | D7590 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 26/10/1968 | D7591 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 26/10/1968 | D5318 | Transfer out to: | 60A | Inverness | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 26/10/1968 | D6848 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 26/10/1968 | D6849 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | on | 27/10/1968 | D8575 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | on | 29/10/1968 | D8584 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | on | 29/10/1968 | D8585 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 30/11/1968 | D3387 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 30/11/1968 | D3532 | Transfer in from: | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 5w/e | 30/11/1968 | D5318 | Transfer in from: | 60A | Inverness | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 5w/e | 30/11/1968 | D5319 | Transfer in from: | 60A | Inverness | ||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | 5w/e | 30/11/1968 | D8502 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | 5w/e | 30/11/1968 | D8515 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | 5w/e | 30/11/1968 | D8525 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/12/1968 | D3281 | Transfer in from: | 56B | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/12/1968 | D3528 | Transfer in from: | 65F | Grangemouth | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/12/1968 | D3533 | Transfer in from: | 67C | Ayr | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/12/1968 | D3535 | Transfer in from: | 62B | Dundee West | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/12/1968 | D3537 | Transfer in from: | 65F | Grangemouth | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/12/1968 | D3542 | Transfer in from: | 63A | Perth South | ||
Diesel | 06 | 0-4-0 | 4w/e | 28/12/1968 | D2443 | Transfer out to: | 64H | Leith Central | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 04/01/1969 | D3387 | Transfer out to: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 04/01/1969 | D3528 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 04/01/1969 | D3532 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 04/01/1969 | D3535 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 25/01/1969 | D5320 | Transfer in from: | 60A | Inverness | ||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 25/01/1969 | D8571 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 25/01/1969 | D8572 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 25/01/1969 | D8573 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | on | 25/01/1969 | D8582 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 26/01/1969 | D3281 | Transfer out to: | 36C | Frodingham | ||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | m/e | 31/01/1969 | D8576 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | on | 02/1969 | D8577 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 01/02/1969 | D3533 | Transfer out to: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 01/02/1969 | D3537 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 01/02/1969 | D3542 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 01/03/1969 | D3544 | Transfer in from: | 63A | Perth South | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 01/03/1969 | D3559 | Transfer in from: | 65F | Grangemouth | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | 5w/e | 01/03/1969 | D8317 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | 5w/e | 01/03/1969 | D8327 | Transfer in from: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | 5w/e | 01/03/1969 | D8574 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | 5w/e | 01/03/1969 | D8578 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | 5w/e | 01/03/1969 | D8579 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 5w/e | 31/05/1969 | D5321 | Transfer in from: | 60A | Inverness | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 5w/e | 31/05/1969 | D5322 | Transfer in from: | 60A | Inverness | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 5w/e | 31/05/1969 | D5323 | Transfer in from: | 60A | Inverness | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 5w/e | 31/05/1969 | D5324 | Transfer in from: | 60A | Inverness | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 5w/e | 31/05/1969 | D5325 | Transfer in from: | 60A | Inverness | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 5w/e | 31/05/1969 | D5326 | Transfer in from: | 60A | Inverness | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 5w/e | 31/05/1969 | D5327 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 5w/e | 31/05/1969 | D5328 | Transfer in from: | 60A | Inverness | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 5w/e | 31/05/1969 | D5329 | Transfer in from: | 60A | Inverness | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | 5w/e | 31/05/1969 | D8325 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | 5w/e | 31/05/1969 | D8326 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 5w/e | 31/05/1969 | D5327 | Transfer out to: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 14/06/1969 | D3544 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 14/06/1969 | D3559 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 28/06/1969 | D7576 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 28/06/1969 | D7578 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 28/06/1969 | D7579 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 28/06/1969 | D7580 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 28/06/1969 | D7581 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 28/06/1969 | D7582 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/06/1969 | D3555 | Transfer out to: | 60A | Inverness | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 28/06/1969 | D7602 | Transfer out to: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 28/06/1969 | D7603 | Transfer out to: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 28/06/1969 | D7604 | Transfer out to: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 28/06/1969 | D7605 | Transfer out to: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 28/06/1969 | D7607 | Transfer out to: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 28/06/1969 | D7608 | Transfer out to: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 26/07/1969 | D8092 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 02/08/1969 | D5066 | Transfer in from: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 02/08/1969 | D7606 | Transfer out to: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | 5w/e | 30/08/1969 | D8505 | Transfer in from: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/10/1969 | D8530 | Reinstated | 98W | |||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/10/1969 | D1969 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/10/1969 | D1970 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/10/1969 | D1971 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/10/1969 | D1972 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/10/1969 | D1973 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/10/1969 | D1573 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/10/1969 | D1577 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/10/1969 | D1578 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/10/1969 | D1580 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/10/1969 | D1581 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | 5w/e | 01/11/1969 | D8322 | Transfer in from: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | 5w/e | 01/11/1969 | D8324 | Transfer in from: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 5w/e | 01/11/1969 | D6857 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | 5w/e | 01/11/1969 | D8092 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | on | 02/11/1969 | D8510 | Reinstated | 98W | |||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 08/11/1969 | D8507 | Reinstated | 98W | |||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 08/11/1969 | D8516 | Reinstated | 98W | |||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 08/11/1969 | D8528 | Reinstated | 98W | |||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 08/11/1969 | D8529 | Reinstated | D10 | Preston Division | ||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 08/11/1969 | D8531 | Reinstated | 98W | |||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 08/11/1969 | D8516 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 08/11/1969 | D8531 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 29/11/1969 | D8561 | Transfer in from: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 29/11/1969 | D8563 | Transfer in from: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 29/11/1969 | D8565 | Transfer in from: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 29/11/1969 | D8579 | Transfer in from: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Diesel | 27 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 28/02/1970 | D5347 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 27 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 28/02/1970 | D5348 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/02/1970 | D3738 | Transfer out to: | 64H | Leith Central | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 28/02/1970 | D7576 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 28/02/1970 | D7579 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | 5w/e | 30/05/1970 | D363 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | 5w/e | 30/05/1970 | D8320 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 5w/e | 30/05/1970 | D6850 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | 2w/e | 11/07/1970 | D170 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 27 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 03/10/1970 | D5413 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 10/10/1970 | D170 | Transfer out to: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 31/10/1970 | D176 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 31/10/1970 | D6844 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 31/10/1970 | D6847 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 31/10/1970 | D6851 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 31/10/1970 | D6936 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 05/12/1970 | D5065 | Transfer in from: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 27 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 26/12/1970 | D5403 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 27 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 26/12/1970 | D5411 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | m/e | 02/1971 | D6840 | Transfer in from: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | m/e | 02/1971 | D6841 | Transfer in from: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 5w/e | 06/02/1971 | D6853 | Transfer in from: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 5w/e | 06/02/1971 | D6854 | Transfer in from: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 5w/e | 06/02/1971 | D6855 | Transfer in from: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 5w/e | 06/02/1971 | D6903 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 5w/e | 06/02/1971 | D6919 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 5w/e | 06/02/1971 | D6937 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | m/e | 28/02/1971 | D6837 | Transfer in from: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | on | 03/03/1971 | D8530 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 20/03/1971 | D176 | Transfer out to: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 27 | Bo-Bo | 7w/e | 27/03/1971 | D5392 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 27 | Bo-Bo | 7w/e | 27/03/1971 | D5393 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 27 | Bo-Bo | 7w/e | 27/03/1971 | D5404 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 27 | Bo-Bo | 7w/e | 27/03/1971 | D5407 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 27 | Bo-Bo | 7w/e | 27/03/1971 | D5408 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 27 | Bo-Bo | 7w/e | 27/03/1971 | D5409 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 27 | Bo-Bo | 7w/e | 27/03/1971 | D5410 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 27 | Bo-Bo | 7w/e | 27/03/1971 | D5412 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 27 | Bo-Bo | 7w/e | 27/03/1971 | D5413 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 27 | Bo-Bo | 7w/e | 27/03/1971 | D5415 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | 7w/e | 27/03/1971 | D5066 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 27 | Bo-Bo | 7w/e | 27/03/1971 | D5413 | Transfer out to: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 27/03/1971 | D6840 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 27/03/1971 | D6841 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | on | 27/03/1971 | D8510 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | on | 27/03/1971 | D8606 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | m/e | 31/03/1971 | D6837 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | 5w/e | 01/05/1971 | D5066 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 27 | Bo-Bo | 5w/e | 01/05/1971 | D5391 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 5w/e | 01/05/1971 | D6919 | Transfer in from: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 5w/e | 01/05/1971 | D6937 | Transfer in from: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 01/05/1971 | D8588 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 01/05/1971 | D8599 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 01/05/1971 | D8600 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 01/05/1971 | D8602 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 01/05/1971 | D8603 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 5w/e | 01/05/1971 | D6853 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 5w/e | 01/05/1971 | D6854 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 29/05/1971 | D8594 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 29/05/1971 | D8597 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 29/05/1971 | D8598 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 29/05/1971 | D5329 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 29/05/1971 | D8607 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 29/05/1971 | D8608 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 29/05/1971 | D8610 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 29/05/1971 | D8612 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 29/05/1971 | D8613 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 29/05/1971 | D8614 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 29/05/1971 | D8615 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 29/05/1971 | D8616 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 12/06/1971 | D8592 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 12/06/1971 | D8593 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 12/06/1971 | D8601 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 12/06/1971 | D8604 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 07/08/1971 | D3550 | Transfer in from: | 62B | Dundee West | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 07/08/1971 | D3558 | Transfer in from: | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 5w/e | 07/08/1971 | D5329 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | 5w/e | 07/08/1971 | D8082 | Transfer in from: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 21/08/1971 | D3550 | Transfer out to: | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 21/08/1971 | D3558 | Transfer out to: | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | on | 21/09/1971 | D8583 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | on | 21/09/1971 | D8586 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | on | 21/09/1971 | D8592 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | on | 21/09/1971 | D8594 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | 6w/e | 02/10/1971 | D8082 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 27 | Bo-Bo | 6w/e | 02/10/1971 | D5415 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | 6w/e | 02/10/1971 | D8082 | Transfer out to: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | on | 04/10/1971 | D8579 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | on | 04/10/1971 | D8588 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | on | 04/10/1971 | D8593 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | on | 04/10/1971 | D8604 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | on | 05/10/1971 | D8528 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | on | 05/10/1971 | D8599 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | on | 06/10/1971 | D8505 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | on | 06/10/1971 | D8580 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | on | 06/10/1971 | D8581 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | on | 06/10/1971 | D8587 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | on | 06/10/1971 | D8597 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | on | 06/10/1971 | D8600 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | on | 06/10/1971 | D8601 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | on | 06/10/1971 | D8602 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | on | 06/10/1971 | D8603 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D8000 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D8001 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D8004 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D8005 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D8007 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D8008 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D8010 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D8017 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D8018 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D8019 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 30/10/1971 | D3985 | Transfer in from: | 2E | Saltley | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 30/10/1971 | D8082 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | on | 01/11/1971 | D8565 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | on | 07/11/1971 | D8529 | Reinstated | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | on | 07/11/1971 | D8598 | Reinstated | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | on | 07/11/1971 | D8529 | Transfer out to: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | on | 07/11/1971 | D8598 | Transfer out to: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | on | 07/11/1971 | D8561 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/11/1971 | D3957 | Transfer in from: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 25/12/1971 | D8507 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 25/12/1971 | D8529 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 25/12/1971 | D8563 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 25/12/1971 | D8598 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 01/01/1972 | D3877 | Transfer out to: | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 01/01/1972 | D3985 | Transfer out to: | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/01/1972 | D3931 | Transfer in from: | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Diesel | 27 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 26/02/1972 | D5380 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 27 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 26/02/1972 | D5401 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 26/02/1972 | D6903 | Transfer in from: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Diesel | 27 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 26/02/1972 | D5347 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 27 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 26/02/1972 | D5348 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 26/02/1972 | D6855 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 01/04/1972 | D3921 | Transfer in from: | 62B | Dundee West | ||
Diesel | 27 | Bo-Bo | 5w/e | 01/04/1972 | D5347 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 27 | Bo-Bo | 5w/e | 01/04/1972 | D5348 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 27 | Bo-Bo | 5w/e | 01/04/1972 | D5380 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 27 | Bo-Bo | 5w/e | 01/04/1972 | D5401 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 27 | Bo-Bo | 5w/e | 01/04/1972 | D5410 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 27 | Bo-Bo | 5w/e | 01/04/1972 | D5412 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 06/05/1972 | D1970 | Transfer out to: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/05/1972 | D3241 | Transfer in from: | 64H | Leith Central | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/05/1972 | D3316 | Transfer in from: | 64H | Leith Central | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/05/1972 | D3317 | Transfer in from: | 64H | Leith Central | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/05/1972 | D3548 | Transfer in from: | 64H | Leith Central | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/05/1972 | D3730 | Transfer in from: | 64H | Leith Central | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/05/1972 | D3731 | Transfer in from: | 64H | Leith Central | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/05/1972 | D3732 | Transfer in from: | 64H | Leith Central | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/05/1972 | D3738 | Transfer in from: | 64H | Leith Central | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/05/1972 | D3881 | Transfer in from: | 64H | Leith Central | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/05/1972 | D3884 | Transfer in from: | 64H | Leith Central | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/05/1972 | D3888 | Transfer in from: | 64H | Leith Central | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/05/1972 | D3889 | Transfer in from: | 64H | Leith Central | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/05/1972 | D3890 | Transfer in from: | 64H | Leith Central | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/05/1972 | D3902 | Transfer in from: | 64H | Leith Central | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/05/1972 | D4096 | Transfer in from: | 64H | Leith Central | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | on | 18/07/1972 | D5328 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 27 | Bo-Bo | 5w/e | 05/08/1972 | D5349 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 05/08/1972 | D3889 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 27 | Bo-Bo | 5w/e | 05/08/1972 | D5348 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 5w/e | 05/08/1972 | D6903 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | on | 09/10/1972 | D5067 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | on | 09/10/1972 | D5068 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 28/10/1972 | D5227 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 28/10/1972 | D6840 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 04/11/1972 | D5151 | Transfer in from: | D09 | Manchester Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 04/11/1972 | D5152 | Transfer in from: | D09 | Manchester Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 04/11/1972 | D5153 | Transfer in from: | D09 | Manchester Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 04/11/1972 | D5154 | Transfer in from: | D09 | Manchester Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 04/11/1972 | D7500 | Transfer in from: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 04/11/1972 | D7565 | Transfer in from: | D01 | London Division | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 04/11/1972 | D357 | Transfer out to: | D08 | Liverpool Division | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 04/11/1972 | D359 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/11/1972 | D6840 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/11/1972 | D6858 | Transfer out to: | 87A | Landore | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 18/11/1972 | D7501 | Transfer in from: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 25/11/1972 | D7500 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 25/11/1972 | D7565 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 25/11/1972 | D6846 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 25/11/1972 | D6919 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 25/11/1972 | D6937 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 25/11/1972 | D7500 | Transfer out to: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 25/11/1972 | D7565 | Transfer out to: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 30/12/1972 | D3921 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 27/01/1973 | D8318 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 27/01/1973 | D8319 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/02/1973 | D3241 | Transfer out to: | 67C | Ayr | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/02/1973 | D3316 | Transfer out to: | 62C | Dunfermline Townhill | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/02/1973 | D3730 | Transfer out to: | 66C | Hamilton (West) | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 24/02/1973 | D5329 | Transfer out to: | 60A | Inverness | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 24/02/1973 | D8000 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 24/02/1973 | D8007 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 24/03/1973 | D8179 | Transfer in from: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 24/03/1973 | D8184 | Transfer in from: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 24/03/1973 | D8191 | Transfer in from: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 24/03/1973 | D8001 | Transfer out to: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 24/03/1973 | D8005 | Transfer out to: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 24/03/1973 | D8008 | Transfer out to: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 21/04/1973 | D8000 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 21/04/1973 | D8007 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 12/05/1973 | D359 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 12/05/1973 | D7500 | Transfer out to: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 12/05/1973 | D7501 | Transfer out to: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 19/05/1973 | D357 | Transfer in from: | D08 | Liverpool Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 19/05/1973 | D5155 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 19/05/1973 | D5327 | Transfer out to: | IS | Inverness | ||
Diesel | 27 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 19/05/1973 | D5347 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 27 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 19/05/1973 | D5349 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 16/06/1973 | D8086 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 16/06/1973 | D8316 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 16/06/1973 | D8179 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 16/06/1973 | D8184 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 01/09/1973 | D8039 | Transfer in from: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 01/09/1973 | D8004 | Transfer out to: | TO | Toton | ||
Diesel | 27 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 08/09/1973 | D5412 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 08/09/1973 | D8085 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 08/09/1973 | D7582 | Transfer out to: | SP | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 08/09/1973 | D7590 | Transfer out to: | SP | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 06/10/1973 | D7576 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 06/10/1973 | D7579 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1973 | D3738 | Transfer out to: | GM | Grangemouth | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 10/11/1973 | D8111 | Transfer in from: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 10/11/1973 | D8000 | Transfer out to: | TO | Toton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 29/12/1973 | D1635 | Transfer in from: | IS | Inverness | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/12/1973 | D3316 | Transfer in from: | 62C | Dunfermline Townhill | ||
Diesel | 27 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 29/12/1973 | D5374 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 29/12/1973 | 47516 | Transfer out to: | IS | Inverness | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 29/12/1973 | D5151 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 27 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 29/12/1973 | D5412 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 29/12/1973 | D8316 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/01/1974 | D3738 | Transfer in from: | GM | Grangemouth | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/01/1974 | D3879 | Transfer out to: | GM | Grangemouth | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/02/1974 | D5243 | Transfer in from: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 23/02/1974 | D5151 | Transfer in from: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/03/1974 | 24111 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 06/04/1974 | 24107 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 06/04/1974 | 24108 | Transfer in from: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 06/04/1974 | 24109 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 5w/e | 27/04/1974 | 25006 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 5w/e | 27/04/1974 | 25009 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 5w/e | 27/04/1974 | D5157 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 27/04/1974 | 08433 | Transfer out to: | AY | Ayr | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | 5w/e | 27/04/1974 | 24107 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | 5w/e | 27/04/1974 | 24108 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | 5w/e | 27/04/1974 | 24109 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | 5w/e | 27/04/1974 | 24111 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 24110 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 40089 | Transfer in from: | D10 | Preston Division | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 40101 | Transfer in from: | KM | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 40103 | Transfer in from: | KM | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 40142 | Transfer in from: | D08 | Liverpool Division | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 40173 | Transfer in from: | D09 | Manchester Division | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 40180 | Transfer in from: | D08 | Liverpool Division | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 40184 | Transfer in from: | D08 | Liverpool Division | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 47469 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 47470 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 47471 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 25001 | Transfer out to: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 25002 | Transfer out to: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 25003 | Transfer out to: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 25004 | Transfer out to: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 25077 | Transfer out to: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 18/05/1974 | 40180 | Transfer out to: | SP | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 25/05/1974 | 25010 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 25/05/1974 | 25011 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 25/05/1974 | 25028 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 25/05/1974 | 25094 | Transfer in from: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 25/05/1974 | 25096 | Transfer in from: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 25/05/1974 | 25216 | Transfer in from: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 25/05/1974 | 25217 | Transfer in from: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 5w/e | 29/06/1974 | 47516 | Transfer in from: | IS | Inverness | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 5w/e | 29/06/1974 | 47471 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 12/10/1974 | 25257 | Transfer in from: | BS | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 12/10/1974 | 25289 | Transfer in from: | SP | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 12/10/1974 | 25308 | Transfer in from: | WN | Willesden | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | 47435 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | 20007 | Transfer out to: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | 20010 | Transfer out to: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | 20017 | Transfer out to: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 12/10/1974 | 20018 | Transfer out to: | TO | Toton | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | 20019 | Transfer out to: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 12/10/1974 | 25093 | Transfer out to: | SP | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 12/10/1974 | 25094 | Transfer out to: | SP | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 12/10/1974 | 25096 | Transfer out to: | BS | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 19/10/1974 | 20017 | Transfer in from: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 19/10/1974 | 20019 | Transfer in from: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 19/10/1974 | 20030 | Transfer in from: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 19/10/1974 | 25005 | Transfer out to: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 19/10/1974 | 25009 | Transfer out to: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 19/10/1974 | 25010 | Transfer out to: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 26/10/1974 | 20024 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 26/10/1974 | 20027 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 26/10/1974 | 20034 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 26/10/1974 | 47466 | Transfer in from: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 26/10/1974 | 47053 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/11/1974 | 25237 | Transfer in from: | D09 | Manchester Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/11/1974 | 25240 | Transfer in from: | SP | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/11/1974 | 25246 | Transfer in from: | D01 | London Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/11/1974 | 25257 | Transfer out to: | LO | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/11/1974 | 25289 | Transfer out to: | SP | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/11/1974 | 25308 | Transfer out to: | SP | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/01/1975 | 25232 | Transfer in from: | SP | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/01/1975 | 25233 | Transfer in from: | SP | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/01/1975 | 25234 | Transfer in from: | SP | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 2w/e | 15/02/1975 | 25026 | Transfer in from: | 91E | To Eastern Region | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 2w/e | 15/02/1975 | 25033 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 2w/e | 15/02/1975 | 25034 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 2w/e | 15/02/1975 | 25035 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 2w/e | 15/02/1975 | 25006 | Transfer out to: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 2w/e | 15/02/1975 | 25007 | Transfer out to: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 2w/e | 15/02/1975 | 25011 | Transfer out to: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 08/03/1975 | 40072 | Transfer in from: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 10/05/1975 | 40041 | Transfer in from: | D10 | Preston Division | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 24/05/1975 | 20179 | Transfer in from: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 24/05/1975 | 20184 | Transfer in from: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 24/05/1975 | 20216 | Transfer in from: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 24/05/1975 | 20221 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 24/05/1975 | 20223 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 24/05/1975 | 20024 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 24/05/1975 | 20027 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 24/05/1975 | 20034 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 24/05/1975 | 20039 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 24/05/1975 | 20085 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 24/05/1975 | 24065 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 24/05/1975 | 24110 | Transfer out to: | IS | Inverness | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 24/05/1975 | 25230 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 24/05/1975 | 25232 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 24/05/1975 | 25233 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 24/05/1975 | 25234 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 24/05/1975 | 25237 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 24/05/1975 | 25240 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 24/05/1975 | 25241 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 24/05/1975 | 25246 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/06/1975 | 08952 | Transfer in from: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 21/06/1975 | 20024 | Transfer in from: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 21/06/1975 | 20027 | Transfer in from: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 21/06/1975 | 20039 | Transfer in from: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 21/06/1975 | 20085 | Transfer in from: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 21/06/1975 | 47141 | Transfer in from: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 21/06/1975 | 47207 | Transfer in from: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 21/06/1975 | 47208 | Transfer in from: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 21/06/1975 | 47317 | Transfer in from: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 21/06/1975 | 47318 | Transfer in from: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | 5w/e | 26/07/1975 | 24071 | To Store | ||||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | 5w/e | 26/07/1975 | 24095 | To Store | ||||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 23/08/1975 | 24066 | To Store | ||||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 23/08/1975 | 24069 | To Store | ||||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 23/08/1975 | 24070 | To Store | ||||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 23/08/1975 | 24072 | To Store | ||||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 23/08/1975 | 24106 | Transfer in from: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 23/08/1975 | 24107 | Transfer in from: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 23/08/1975 | 24108 | Transfer in from: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 23/08/1975 | 24109 | Transfer in from: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 23/08/1975 | 24111 | Transfer in from: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 23/08/1975 | 24147 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 23/08/1975 | 24150 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 2w/e | 23/08/1975 | 25084 | Transfer in from: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 2w/e | 23/08/1975 | 25085 | Transfer in from: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 2w/e | 23/08/1975 | 25238 | Transfer in from: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 23/08/1975 | 20024 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 23/08/1975 | 20027 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 23/08/1975 | 20039 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 23/08/1975 | 20085 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 23/08/1975 | 25034 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 3w/e | 30/08/1975 | 25215 | Transfer out to: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 3w/e | 30/08/1975 | 25216 | Transfer out to: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 3w/e | 30/08/1975 | 25217 | Transfer out to: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | on | 08/09/1975 | 24009 | Reinstated | 98S | |||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | on | 05/10/1975 | 26016 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/10/1975 | 25091 | Transfer in from: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/10/1975 | 25092 | Transfer in from: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/10/1975 | 25093 | Transfer in from: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/10/1975 | 25094 | Transfer in from: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/10/1975 | 25096 | Transfer in from: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/10/1975 | 25098 | Transfer in from: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/10/1975 | 25171 | Transfer in from: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/10/1975 | 25172 | Transfer in from: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 11/10/1975 | 40099 | Transfer in from: | LO | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 11/10/1975 | 40123 | Transfer in from: | D09 | Manchester Division | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 25/10/1975 | 24106 | To Store | ||||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 25/10/1975 | 24108 | To Store | ||||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 25/10/1975 | 24109 | To Store | ||||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 25/10/1975 | 24111 | To Store | ||||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 25/10/1975 | 24110 | Transfer in from: | IS | Inverness | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 25/10/1975 | 24113 | Transfer in from: | IS | Inverness | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 25/10/1975 | 24115 | Transfer in from: | 60A | Inverness | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 25/10/1975 | 24116 | Transfer in from: | 60A | Inverness | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 25/10/1975 | 24118 | Transfer in from: | 60A | Inverness | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 25/10/1975 | 24120 | Transfer in from: | 60A | Inverness | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 25/10/1975 | 24121 | Transfer in from: | 60A | Inverness | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 25/10/1975 | 24123 | Transfer in from: | 60A | Inverness | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 25/10/1975 | 24125 | Transfer in from: | 60A | Inverness | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 25/10/1975 | 24126 | Transfer in from: | 60A | Inverness | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 25/10/1975 | 24128 | Transfer in from: | 60A | Inverness | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 25/10/1975 | 25029 | Transfer in from: | 91X | To Scottish Region | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 25/10/1975 | 25030 | Transfer in from: | 91X | To Scottish Region | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 25/10/1975 | 25031 | Transfer in from: | 91X | To Scottish Region | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 25/10/1975 | 47269 | Transfer in from: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 25/10/1975 | 26008 | Transfer out to: | IS | Inverness | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 25/10/1975 | 26011 | Transfer out to: | IS | Inverness | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 25/10/1975 | 26015 | Transfer out to: | IS | Inverness | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 25/10/1975 | 26019 | Transfer out to: | IS | Inverness | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 25/10/1975 | 26021 | Transfer out to: | IS | Inverness | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 25/10/1975 | 26022 | Transfer out to: | IS | Inverness | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 25/10/1975 | 26023 | Transfer out to: | IS | Inverness | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 25/10/1975 | 26024 | Transfer out to: | IS | Inverness | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 25/10/1975 | 26025 | Transfer out to: | IS | Inverness | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 25/10/1975 | 26026 | Transfer out to: | IS | Inverness | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | 3w/e | 15/11/1975 | 24125 | To Store | ||||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | 3w/e | 15/11/1975 | 24106 | Transfer in from: | 98S | |||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | 3w/e | 15/11/1975 | 24112 | Transfer in from: | IS | Inverness | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | 3w/e | 15/11/1975 | 24119 | Transfer in from: | 60A | Inverness | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | 3w/e | 15/11/1975 | 24124 | Transfer in from: | 60A | Inverness | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | 3w/e | 15/11/1975 | 24127 | Transfer in from: | 60A | Inverness | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | 3w/e | 15/11/1975 | 24129 | Transfer in from: | 60A | Inverness | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | 3w/e | 15/11/1975 | 24130 | Transfer in from: | 60A | Inverness | ||
Diesel | 27 | Bo-Bo | 3w/e | 15/11/1975 | 27103 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 3w/e | 15/11/1975 | 25030 | Transfer out to: | IS | Inverness | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 3w/e | 15/11/1975 | 25031 | Transfer out to: | IS | Inverness | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 3w/e | 15/11/1975 | 25092 | Transfer out to: | IS | Inverness | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 3w/e | 15/11/1975 | 25093 | Transfer out to: | IS | Inverness | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 3w/e | 15/11/1975 | 25096 | Transfer out to: | IS | Inverness | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 3w/e | 15/11/1975 | 26009 | Transfer out to: | IS | Inverness | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 3w/e | 15/11/1975 | 26010 | Transfer out to: | IS | Inverness | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 3w/e | 15/11/1975 | 26012 | Transfer out to: | IS | Inverness | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 3w/e | 15/11/1975 | 26013 | Transfer out to: | IS | Inverness | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 3w/e | 15/11/1975 | 26014 | Transfer out to: | IS | Inverness | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 3w/e | 15/11/1975 | 26017 | Transfer out to: | IS | Inverness | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 3w/e | 15/11/1975 | 26018 | Transfer out to: | IS | Inverness | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 3w/e | 15/11/1975 | 26020 | Transfer out to: | IS | Inverness | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 3w/e | 15/11/1975 | 26028 | Transfer out to: | IS | Inverness | ||
Diesel | 27 | Bo-Bo | 3w/e | 15/11/1975 | 27103 | Transfer out to: | HA | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | 2w/e | 29/11/1975 | 24117 | Transfer in from: | 60A | Inverness | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | 5w/e | 03/01/1976 | 24126 | To Store | ||||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | 5w/e | 03/01/1976 | 24127 | To Store | ||||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | 5w/e | 03/01/1976 | 24065 | Transfer in from: | 98S | |||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | 5w/e | 03/01/1976 | 24069 | Transfer in from: | 98S | |||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | 5w/e | 03/01/1976 | 24094 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | 5w/e | 03/01/1976 | 24094 | Transfer out to: | HA | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 18/01/1976 | 40041 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 01/02/1976 | 40089 | To Store | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 01/02/1976 | 40161 | To Store | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 01/02/1976 | 40048 | Transfer in from: | GD | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | on | 02/02/1976 | 24117 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 5w/e | 07/02/1976 | 47207 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | 4w/e | 06/03/1976 | 40161 | Reinstated | 98S | |||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 06/03/1976 | 25237 | Transfer in from: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 06/03/1976 | 20030 | Transfer out to: | 91M | To London Midland Region | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | 5w/e | 01/05/1976 | 24119 | To Store | ||||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | 5w/e | 01/05/1976 | 24147 | To Store | ||||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | 5w/e | 01/05/1976 | 24103 | Transfer in from: | 98S | |||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | 5w/e | 01/05/1976 | 24104 | Transfer in from: | 98S | |||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 5w/e | 01/05/1976 | 47469 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 3w/e | 08/05/1976 | 25078 | Transfer in from: | SP | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 3w/e | 08/05/1976 | 25079 | Transfer in from: | SP | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 15/05/1976 | 25059 | Transfer in from: | CD | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 15/05/1976 | 25078 | Transfer out to: | TO | Toton | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 29/05/1976 | 25012 | Reinstated | 98S | |||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 29/05/1976 | 24009 | To Store | ||||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 29/05/1976 | 24128 | To Store | ||||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 29/05/1976 | 25062 | Transfer in from: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/05/1976 | 08952 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 29/05/1976 | 25231 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 29/05/1976 | 47141 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 29/05/1976 | 47208 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 12/06/1976 | 25029 | Transfer out to: | TO | Toton | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 5w/e | 03/07/1976 | 25014 | Reinstated | 98S | |||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | 5w/e | 03/07/1976 | 24123 | To Store | ||||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 5w/e | 03/07/1976 | 25062 | Transfer out to: | IS | Inverness | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | 2w/e | 04/07/1976 | 20017 | Transfer out to: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | 3w/e | 24/07/1976 | 24124 | To Store | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 24/07/1976 | 47317 | Transfer out to: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 07/08/1976 | 47318 | Transfer out to: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | 6w/e | 04/09/1976 | 24103 | To Store | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 6w/e | 04/09/1976 | 08755 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 6w/e | 04/09/1976 | 08881 | Transfer in from: | 62B | Dundee West | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 6w/e | 04/09/1976 | 25094 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 6w/e | 04/09/1976 | 25098 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 6w/e | 04/09/1976 | 47268 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 6w/e | 04/09/1976 | 47269 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | on | 15/09/1976 | 24116 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 29/09/1976 | 24094 | To Store | ||||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | m/e | 10/1976 | 24065 | To Store | ||||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | m/e | 10/1976 | 24104 | To Store | ||||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | m/e | 10/1976 | 24106 | To Store | ||||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | m/e | 10/1976 | 24112 | To Store | ||||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | m/e | 10/1976 | 24113 | To Store | ||||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | m/e | 10/1976 | 24115 | To Store | ||||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | m/e | 10/1976 | 24118 | To Store | ||||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | m/e | 10/1976 | 24120 | To Store | ||||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | m/e | 10/1976 | 24121 | To Store | ||||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | m/e | 10/1976 | 24129 | To Store | ||||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 02/10/1976 | 24069 | To Store | ||||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | on | 01/12/1976 | 24107 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | on | 01/12/1976 | 24110 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | on | 01/12/1976 | 24130 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | on | 01/12/1976 | 24150 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/12/1976 | 25172 | Transfer out to: | SP | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/12/1976 | 47466 | Transfer in from: | HA | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 12/12/1976 | 20019 | Transfer out to: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/12/1976 | 47466 | Transfer out to: | HA | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | m/e | 01/1977 | 20203 | Transfer in from: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 01/1977 | 47470 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 04/02/1977 | 25012 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 04/1977 | 08722 | Transfer out to: | GM | Grangemouth | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 04/1977 | 08882 | Transfer out to: | IS | Inverness | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | m/e | 05/1977 | 25034 | Transfer in from: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | m/e | 05/1977 | 25037 | Transfer in from: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | m/e | 05/1977 | 25075 | Transfer in from: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 05/1977 | 47036 | Transfer in from: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 05/1977 | 47037 | Transfer in from: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | m/e | 05/1977 | 25226 | Transfer out to: | IS | Inverness | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | m/e | 05/1977 | 25228 | Transfer out to: | IS | Inverness | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | m/e | 05/1977 | 25229 | Transfer out to: | IS | Inverness | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | m/e | 05/1977 | 25238 | Transfer out to: | IS | Inverness | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 01/05/1977 | 25046 | Transfer in from: | SP | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 01/05/1977 | 25050 | Transfer in from: | KD | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 01/05/1977 | 25061 | Transfer in from: | CD | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 01/05/1977 | 25065 | Transfer in from: | D01 | London Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 01/05/1977 | 25066 | Transfer in from: | TO | Toton | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 01/05/1977 | 25076 | Transfer in from: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | m/e | 31/05/1977 | 25061 | Transfer out to: | CD | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | m/e | 06/1977 | 25014 | To Store | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 06/1977 | 47493 | Transfer in from: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 06/1977 | 47494 | Transfer in from: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 06/1977 | 08246 | Transfer out to: | GM | Grangemouth | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 08/1977 | 08247 | Transfer out to: | DT | Dunfermline Townhill | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 17/08/1977 | 40072 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 10/1977 | 47465 | Transfer in from: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 18/10/1977 | 40048 | To Store | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 15/01/1978 | 40150 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 15/01/1978 | 40151 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 22/01/1978 | 47541 | Transfer in from: | SF | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 29/01/1978 | 47541 | Transfer out to: | YK | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | m/e | 02/1978 | 25049 | Transfer in from: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | m/e | 02/1978 | 25086 | Transfer in from: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | m/e | 02/1978 | 25087 | Transfer in from: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | m/e | 02/1978 | 25235 | Transfer in from: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | m/e | 02/1978 | 40088 | Transfer in from: | LO | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | m/e | 02/1978 | 40094 | Transfer in from: | D10 | Preston Division | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 02/1978 | 47269 | Transfer in from: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 02/1978 | 47465 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 02/1978 | 47466 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 12/02/1978 | 47553 | Transfer in from: | YK | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | m/e | 03/1978 | 40088 | Transfer out to: | KD | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | m/e | 03/1978 | 40094 | Transfer out to: | KD | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 05/03/1978 | 40145 | Transfer in from: | HM | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 05/03/1978 | 40148 | Transfer in from: | 56B | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 15/10/1978 | 25091 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 15/10/1978 | 25171 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 27 | Bo-Bo | on | 01/01/1979 | 27201 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | m/e | 01/1980 | 25008 | Transfer in from: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 21/04/1980 | 40142 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | m/e | 05/1980 | 25006 | Transfer in from: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | m/e | 05/1980 | 25007 | Transfer in from: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 09/06/1980 | 25008 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 07/07/1980 | 40123 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 27 | Bo-Bo | on | 01/08/1980 | 27202 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 28/09/1980 | 25087 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 02/11/1980 | 25026 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 01/12/1980 | 25006 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 01/12/1980 | 25007 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 01/12/1980 | 25028 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 14/12/1980 | 25066 | Transfer out to: | TO | Toton | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 14/12/1980 | 25086 | Transfer out to: | SP | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 29/12/1980 | 40161 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 01/02/1981 | 25046 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 01/02/1981 | 25065 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 01/02/1981 | 40151 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 55 | Co-Co | on | 08/02/1981 | 55006 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 22/02/1981 | 08572 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 05/04/1981 | 40066 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 31/05/1981 | 40060 | Transfer out to: | KD | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 31/05/1981 | 40150 | Transfer out to: | KD | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 31/05/1981 | 40158 | Transfer out to: | KD | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 21/06/1981 | 47160 | Transfer in from: | SF | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 21/06/1981 | 47163 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 21/06/1981 | 47209 | Transfer in from: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | m/e | 07/1981 | 25075 | Transfer out to: | CW | Cricklewood East | ||
Diesel | 27 | Bo-Bo | m/e | 07/1981 | 27203 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | m/e | 07/1981 | 40162 | Transfer out to: | KD | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 06/07/1981 | 40165 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 24/07/1981 | 08565 | To Store | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 03/08/1981 | 08718 | Transfer in from: | FW | Fort William | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 03/08/1981 | 08725 | Transfer in from: | 62B | Dundee West | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 03/08/1981 | 08725 | Transfer in from: | HA | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 03/08/1981 | 08725 | Transfer out to: | HA | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 24/08/1981 | 40173 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | m/e | 09/1981 | 20007 | Reinstated | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | m/e | 09/1981 | 20020 | Reinstated | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | m/e | 09/1981 | 20085 | Reinstated | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | m/e | 09/1981 | 20126 | Reinstated | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 09/1981 | 08732 | Transfer in from: | HN | Hamilton (West) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 09/1981 | 08764 | Transfer in from: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | m/e | 09/1981 | 20137 | Transfer in from: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | m/e | 09/1981 | 20138 | Transfer in from: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | m/e | 09/1981 | 20201 | Transfer in from: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | m/e | 09/1981 | 26023 | Transfer in from: | IS | Inverness | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | m/e | 09/1981 | 26025 | Transfer in from: | IS | Inverness | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | m/e | 09/1981 | 26026 | Transfer in from: | IS | Inverness | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 09/1981 | 47001 | Transfer in from: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 09/1981 | 47002 | Transfer in from: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | m/e | 09/1981 | 40061 | Transfer out to: | LO | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | m/e | 09/1981 | 40063 | Transfer out to: | SP | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | m/e | 09/1981 | 40064 | Transfer out to: | LO | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | m/e | 09/1981 | 40101 | Transfer out to: | KD | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | m/e | 09/1981 | 40148 | Transfer out to: | LO | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | m/e | 09/1981 | 40157 | Transfer out to: | SP | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | m/e | 09/1981 | 40159 | Transfer out to: | LO | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | m/e | 09/1981 | 40160 | Transfer out to: | SP | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | m/e | 09/1981 | 40164 | Transfer out to: | SP | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | m/e | 09/1981 | 40167 | Transfer out to: | LO | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | m/e | 09/1981 | 40168 | Transfer out to: | LO | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | m/e | 09/1981 | 20020 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | m/e | 09/1981 | 20126 | Transfer out to: | ML | Motherwell | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 06/09/1981 | 47009 | Transfer in from: | SF | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 06/09/1981 | 47041 | Transfer in from: | SF | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 06/09/1981 | 47042 | Transfer in from: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 10/1981 | 08717 | Transfer out to: | 98W | |||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 05/10/1981 | 47051 | Transfer in from: | CD | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 55 | Co-Co | on | 28/10/1981 | 55004 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | m/e | 11/1981 | 25050 | Transfer out to: | CW | Cricklewood East | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 09/11/1981 | 40065 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 21/11/1981 | 40062 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 55 | Co-Co | on | 20/12/1981 | 55013 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 55 | Co-Co | on | 24/12/1981 | 55010 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 55 | Co-Co | on | 30/12/1981 | 55016 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 55 | Co-Co | on | 31/12/1981 | 55019 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 55 | Co-Co | on | 31/12/1981 | 55021 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 55 | Co-Co | on | 02/01/1982 | 55022 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 07/02/1982 | 40103 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 14/02/1982 | 40166 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 21/03/1982 | 25085 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 06/06/1982 | 40163 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 21/12/1982 | 40184 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 24/04/1983 | 25033 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 10/06/1983 | 40145 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 28/08/1983 | 25079 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 18/12/1983 | 25084 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 08/01/1984 | 25049 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 22/10/1984 | 40099 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 12/11/1984 | 25076 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 01/03/1985 | 25235 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 10/06/1985 | 25237 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 02/12/1985 | 08564 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 27 | Bo-Bo | on | 01/02/1986 | 27208 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 27 | Bo-Bo | on | 01/04/1986 | 27047 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 27 | Bo-Bo | on | 01/05/1986 | 27045 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 27 | Bo-Bo | on | 01/05/1986 | 27058 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 27 | Bo-Bo | on | 01/05/1986 | 27064 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 27 | Bo-Bo | on | 01/05/1986 | 27065 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 27 | Bo-Bo | on | 01/05/1986 | 27207 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 26/10/1986 | 20184 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 25/11/1986 | 47001 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 22/12/1986 | 25034 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 19/01/1987 | 25037 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 15/03/1987 | 25035 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 20/03/1987 | 25059 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 22/04/1987 | 20111 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 27 | Bo-Bo | on | 01/07/1987 | 27063 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | on | 21/09/1987 | 26025 | To Store | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 04/10/1987 | 08791 | Transfer in from: | EJ | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 04/10/1987 | 08793 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 04/10/1987 | 20217 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 47002 | Transfer out to: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 47051 | Transfer out to: | CD | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 47209 | Transfer out to: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 47435 | Transfer out to: | CD | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 47627 | Transfer out to: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 47701 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 47706 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 47708 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | on | 05/10/1987 | 26003 | To Store | ||||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 09/11/1987 | 20191 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 09/11/1987 | 20216 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 10/11/1987 | 20220 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 10/11/1987 | 20221 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 10/11/1987 | 20223 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 15/12/1987 | 20222 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 06/05/1988 | 08764 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 15/05/1988 | 20086 | Transfer out to: | TE | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 15/05/1988 | 20179 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 15/05/1988 | 20201 | Transfer out to: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 15/05/1988 | 20203 | Transfer out to: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 15/05/1988 | 20218 | Transfer out to: | TO | Toton | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 15/05/1988 | 20219 | Transfer out to: | TO | Toton | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 15/05/1988 | 20224 | Transfer out to: | TO | Toton | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 15/05/1988 | 20225 | Transfer out to: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 15/05/1988 | 20226 | Transfer out to: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 15/05/1988 | 20227 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | on | 15/05/1988 | 26001 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | on | 15/05/1988 | 26002 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | on | 15/05/1988 | 26004 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | on | 15/05/1988 | 26005 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | on | 15/05/1988 | 26006 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | on | 15/05/1988 | 26007 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 47517 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 47553 | Transfer out to: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 47604 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 47637 | Transfer out to: | CD | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 22/05/1988 | 47605 | Transfer out to: | CD | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 06/10/1989 | 08763 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | on | 21/09/1990 | 26023 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 01/03/1991 | 47009 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 08/03/1991 | 20085 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 01/04/1991 | 47643 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 14/08/1992 | 08725 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | on | 24/11/1992 | 26026 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 01/12/1992 | 20137 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 23/04/1993 | 08789 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 01/07/1993 | 20007 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 23/07/1993 | 08793 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 10/09/1993 | 08755 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | on | 04/10/1993 | 26032 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/10/1994 | 08791 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 01/10/1994 | 47586 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 01/03/2001 | 47630 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/02/2004 | 08881 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 28/02/2007 | 08720 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 28/02/2007 | 47270 | Condemned |