Depot: Immingham
Type | Class | Wheels | Period | Date | Number | Event | Code | Depot | Length of Stay | Notes |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | Y2 | 0-4-0ST | m/e | 03/1883 | 511 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Y2 | 0-4-0ST | m/e | 03/1883 | 512 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | B5 | 4-6-0 | m/e | 01/1904 | 181 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | B18 | 4-6-0 | m/e | 01/1904 | 196 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | m/e | 03/1904 | 144 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | m/e | 12/1910 | 964 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | m/e | 01/1911 | 1181 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 27/08/1912 | 1203 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 12/1912 | 1242 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 12/1912 | 1245 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 01/11/1914 | 1237 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | m/e | 12/1914 | 272 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 27/04/1917 | 403 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 06/02/1920 | 1244 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | B3 | 4-6-0 | on | 22/10/1920 | 1164 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 03/02/1922 | 36 | Transfer in from: | NEA | Neasden | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 03/02/1922 | 37 | Transfer in from: | NEA | Neasden | ||
Steam | B3 | 4-6-0 | m/e | 04/1922 | 1168 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B5 | 4-6-0 | on | 19/05/1922 | 180 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | B5 | 4-6-0 | on | 19/05/1922 | 183 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | B5 | 4-6-0 | on | 19/05/1922 | 184 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 28/07/1922 | 38 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/10/1922 | 1204 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/10/1922 | 1240 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/10/1922 | 1243 | Transfer in from: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 17/11/1922 | 1248 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 17/11/1922 | 1249 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 17/11/1922 | 1250 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 17/11/1922 | 1252 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 1923 | 1240 | Transfer out to: | KEA | Keadby | ||
Steam | B3 | 4-6-0 | m/e | 01/1923 | 1169 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 12/01/1923 | 36 | Transfer out to: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 26/01/1923 | 37 | Transfer out to: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 28/01/1923 | 38 | Transfer out to: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 02/02/1923 | 1252 | Transfer out to: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | on | 10/03/1923 | 273 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | on | 10/03/1923 | 274 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | on | 10/03/1923 | 276 | Transfer in from: | NEA | Neasden | ||
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | on | 10/03/1923 | 337 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | on | 10/03/1923 | 367 | Transfer in from: | NEA | Neasden | ||
Steam | B18 | 4-6-0 | on | 27/04/1923 | 195 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B3 | 4-6-0 | m/e | 08/1923 | 1169 | Transfer out to: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | B3 | 4-6-0 | m/e | 12/1923 | 1167 | Transfer in from: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | B5 | 4-6-0 | on | 05/01/1924 | 183 | Transfer out to: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | B5 | 4-6-0 | on | 05/01/1924 | 184 | Transfer out to: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 06/01/1924 | 334 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 06/01/1924 | 352 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 06/01/1924 | 379 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 06/01/1924 | 393 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 06/01/1924 | 395 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 09/02/1924 | 378 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B3 | 4-6-0 | on | 15/02/1924 | 1164 | Transfer out to: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 22/02/1924 | 6345 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 22/02/1924 | 6364 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 24/02/1924 | 1247 | Transfer in from: | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 01/03/1924 | 6304 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B5 | 4-6-0 | on | 04/03/1924 | 186 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 26/03/1924 | 1246 | Transfer in from: | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | ||
Steam | B3 | 4-6-0 | on | 06/04/1924 | 6168 | Transfer out to: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 08/04/1924 | 6340 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/04/1924 | 6329 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 24/04/1924 | 1206 | Transfer in from: | KEA | Keadby | ||
Steam | B5 | 4-6-0 | on | 24/04/1924 | 185 | Transfer in from: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 03/05/1924 | 5482 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 03/05/1924 | 6297 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 03/05/1924 | 6334 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 03/05/1924 | 6339 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 03/05/1924 | 6348 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 10/05/1924 | 5469 | Transfer in from: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | B5 | 4-6-0 | on | 22/05/1924 | 1068 | Transfer in from: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 30/05/1924 | 5484 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 09/06/1924 | 1240 | Transfer in from: | KEA | Keadby | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 05/07/1924 | 5966 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B3 | 4-6-0 | on | 05/08/1924 | 6167 | Transfer out to: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | B5 | 4-6-0 | on | 15/08/1924 | 185 | Transfer out to: | LIN | Lincoln | ||
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | on | 31/01/1925 | 5274 | Transfer out to: | NEA | Neasden | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 04/07/1925 | 6246 | Transfer out to: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 04/07/1925 | 6340 | Transfer out to: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 09/07/1925 | 6246 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 09/07/1925 | 6340 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | B5 | 4-6-0 | on | 18/07/1925 | 6071 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/10/1925 | 6512 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B5 | 4-6-0 | on | 08/10/1925 | 5184 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 15/10/1925 | 6538 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 22/10/1925 | 6515 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 24/10/1925 | 6500 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 19/11/1925 | 477 | Transfer in from: | NEA | Neasden | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 17/12/1925 | 5482 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1926 | 378 | Transfer out to: | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 15/01/1926 | 6203 | Transfer out to: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 27/01/1926 | 6329 | Transfer out to: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 29/01/1926 | 6203 | Transfer in from: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 06/02/1926 | 6329 | Transfer in from: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 20/02/1926 | 5459 | Transfer in from: | NEA | Neasden | ||
Steam | B5 | 4-6-0 | on | 22/02/1926 | 6068 | Transfer out to: | COP | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ||
Steam | B5 | 4-6-0 | on | 27/04/1926 | 6068 | Transfer in from: | COP | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ||
Steam | B18 | 4-6-0 | on | 27/04/1926 | 5196 | Transfer out to: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | B18 | 4-6-0 | on | 28/04/1926 | 5195 | Transfer out to: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 05/06/1926 | 5484 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B5 | 4-6-0 | on | 06/08/1926 | 5184 | Transfer out to: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | B5 | 4-6-0 | on | 07/08/1926 | 5186 | Transfer out to: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/10/1926 | 5005 | Transfer in from: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/10/1926 | 5026 | Transfer in from: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/10/1926 | 5069 | Transfer in from: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 26/10/1926 | 5133 | Transfer in from: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/11/1926 | 1484 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 02/12/1926 | 1492 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 03/12/1926 | 1493 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 10/12/1926 | 1494 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 14/12/1926 | 1495 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 15/12/1926 | 6297 | Transfer out to: | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/12/1926 | 5966 | Transfer out to: | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 24/12/1926 | 5005 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 24/12/1926 | 5026 | Transfer out to: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 24/12/1926 | 5069 | Transfer out to: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 29/12/1926 | 5133 | Transfer out to: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 06/04/1927 | 6181 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 13/05/1927 | 1265 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | B3 | 4-6-0 | on | 14/05/1927 | 6168 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 18/05/1927 | 1266 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 20/05/1927 | 1267 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 25/05/1927 | 1272 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 28/05/1927 | 1268 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 28/05/1927 | 1273 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/05/1927 | 1269 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/05/1927 | 1274 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 03/06/1927 | 1817 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 08/06/1927 | 1277 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 09/06/1927 | 1275 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 10/06/1927 | 1281 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 16/06/1927 | 1282 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/06/1927 | 1816 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 26/06/1927 | 5072 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 27/06/1927 | 5477 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 25/07/1927 | 6571 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | B5 | 4-6-0 | on | 26/07/1927 | 5180 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | B5 | 4-6-0 | on | 26/07/1927 | 6068 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 11/08/1927 | 2879 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 02/09/1927 | 1298 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 10/09/1927 | 6572 | Transfer in from: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 16/09/1927 | 1833 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 29/09/1927 | 6621 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 30/09/1927 | 1886 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 01/10/1927 | 5964 | Transfer out to: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 08/10/1927 | 1269 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 13/10/1927 | 1265 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 13/10/1927 | 1484 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 14/10/1927 | 1266 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 14/10/1927 | 1267 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 14/10/1927 | 1268 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 19/10/1927 | 6622 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 27/10/1927 | 6246 | Transfer out to: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 01/11/1927 | 6249 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 09/11/1927 | 6639 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 24/11/1927 | 6629 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 1928 | 6304 | Transfer out to: | LIN | Lincoln | ||
Steam | B5 | 4-6-0 | on | 14/01/1928 | 5181 | Transfer out to: | LIN | Lincoln | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 10/02/1928 | 1270 | Transfer in from: | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 17/02/1928 | 1274 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 20/02/1928 | 1298 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B19 | 4-6-0 | on | 25/04/1928 | 5427 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B5 | 4-6-0 | on | 18/07/1928 | 6071 | Transfer out to: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | B3 | 4-6-0 | on | 20/07/1928 | 6168 | Transfer out to: | NEA | Neasden | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 11/08/1928 | 5144 | Transfer out to: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 27/10/1928 | 6348 | Transfer out to: | TUX | Tuxford | ||
Steam | B3 | 4-6-0 | on | 12/12/1928 | 6164 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B3 | 4-6-0 | on | 15/12/1928 | 6165 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B19 | 4-6-0 | on | 15/12/1928 | 5427 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/01/1929 | 6240 | Transfer out to: | TUX | Tuxford | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 02/02/1929 | 6240 | Transfer in from: | TUX | Tuxford | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 01/03/1929 | 6206 | Transfer out to: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 02/03/1929 | 5062 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 02/03/1929 | 6345 | Transfer out to: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 03/03/1929 | 6177 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 05/03/1929 | 6204 | Transfer out to: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 08/03/1929 | 5151 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 09/05/1929 | 5072 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B5 | 4-6-0 | on | 30/05/1929 | 5184 | Transfer in from: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 30/05/1929 | 6374 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 04/06/1929 | 6215 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 06/06/1929 | 6223 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 10/06/1929 | 5062 | Transfer out to: | KEA | Keadby | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 13/06/1929 | 5151 | Transfer out to: | KEA | Keadby | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 16/06/1929 | 1494 | Transfer out to: | LIN | Lincoln | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 16/06/1929 | 1495 | Transfer out to: | LIN | Lincoln | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 19/06/1929 | 1275 | Transfer out to: | LIN | Lincoln | ||
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | on | 24/06/1929 | 5273 | Transfer out to: | KEA | Keadby | ||
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | on | 24/06/1929 | 5367 | Transfer out to: | KEA | Keadby | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 04/07/1929 | 1272 | Transfer out to: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 10/07/1929 | 2704 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 16/07/1929 | 5467 | Transfer in from: | NEA | Neasden | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 18/07/1929 | 5459 | Transfer out to: | NEA | Neasden | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 18/07/1929 | 5469 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 19/07/1929 | 5478 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 29/07/1929 | 1494 | Transfer in from: | LIN | Lincoln | ||
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | on | 17/08/1929 | 5276 | Transfer out to: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 19/08/1929 | 1272 | Transfer in from: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 03/09/1929 | 6517 | Transfer in from: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 14/09/1929 | 6278 | Transfer in from: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 20/09/1929 | 6177 | Transfer out to: | KEA | Keadby | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 21/09/1929 | 2704 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 27/09/1929 | 6278 | Transfer out to: | KEA | Keadby | ||
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | on | 02/10/1929 | 5272 | Transfer out to: | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 17/10/1929 | 6247 | Transfer out to: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 25/10/1929 | 6366 | Transfer in from: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 29/10/1929 | 5085 | Transfer in from: | KEA | Keadby | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/10/1929 | 1495 | Transfer in from: | LIN | Lincoln | ||
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | on | 05/11/1929 | 5369 | Transfer in from: | NEA | Neasden | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 05/11/1929 | 6570 | Transfer out to: | NEA | Neasden | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 15/11/1929 | 6243 | Transfer out to: | KEA | Keadby | ||
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | on | 21/11/1929 | 5367 | Transfer in from: | KEA | Keadby | ||
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | on | 30/11/1929 | 5273 | Transfer in from: | KEA | Keadby | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/12/1929 | 6362 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 14/12/1929 | 1281 | Transfer out to: | LIN | Lincoln | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 10/01/1930 | 5139 | Transfer in from: | KEA | Keadby | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 21/01/1930 | 6622 | Transfer out to: | TUX | Tuxford | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/02/1930 | 6642 | Transfer in from: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 24/02/1930 | 6642 | Transfer out to: | TUX | Tuxford | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 27/02/1930 | 6568 | Transfer out to: | KEA | Keadby | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 27/02/1930 | 6572 | Transfer out to: | KEA | Keadby | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 26/03/1930 | 6348 | Transfer in from: | TUX | Tuxford | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 10/04/1930 | 6538 | Transfer out to: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 17/04/1930 | 6364 | Transfer out to: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | B3 | 4-6-0 | on | 15/05/1930 | 6169 | Transfer in from: | NEA | Neasden | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 05/06/1930 | 6339 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | B5 | 4-6-0 | on | 24/07/1930 | 5184 | Transfer out to: | LIN | Lincoln | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 26/07/1930 | 1272 | Transfer out to: | LIN | Lincoln | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 26/07/1930 | 1273 | Transfer out to: | LIN | Lincoln | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 02/08/1930 | 6144 | Transfer in from: | KEA | Keadby | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 03/09/1930 | 1495 | Transfer out to: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | B5 | 4-6-0 | on | 25/09/1930 | 5184 | Transfer in from: | LIN | Lincoln | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 12/10/1930 | 5162 | Transfer in from: | KEA | Keadby | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 30/10/1930 | 5057 | Transfer in from: | KEA | Keadby | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 01/11/1930 | 5063 | Transfer in from: | KEA | Keadby | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 01/11/1930 | 5404 | Transfer in from: | KEA | Keadby | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 04/11/1930 | 5352 | Transfer out to: | KEA | Keadby | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 06/11/1930 | 6242 | Transfer out to: | KEA | Keadby | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 06/11/1930 | 6248 | Transfer out to: | KEA | Keadby | ||
Steam | B3 | 4-6-0 | on | 06/12/1930 | 6164 | Transfer out to: | NEA | Neasden | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 09/12/1930 | 6244 | Transfer out to: | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 09/12/1930 | 6245 | Transfer out to: | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 12/12/1930 | 5163 | Transfer in from: | KEA | Keadby | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/01/1931 | 6569 | Transfer out to: | KEA | Keadby | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 13/02/1931 | 1493 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 28/02/1931 | 6203 | Transfer out to: | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 04/03/1931 | 5404 | Transfer out to: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | on | 16/03/1931 | 5276 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 25/03/1931 | 6140 | Transfer in from: | KEA | Keadby | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 16/06/1931 | 6223 | Transfer out to: | KEA | Keadby | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 23/06/1931 | 5073 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | on | 24/06/1931 | 5336 | Transfer in from: | NEA | Neasden | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 29/06/1931 | 6278 | Transfer in from: | KEA | Keadby | ||
Steam | Y2 | 0-4-0ST | on | 08/07/1931 | 6430 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Y2 | 0-4-0ST | on | 08/07/1931 | 6431 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B3 | 4-6-0 | on | 16/07/1931 | 6167 | Transfer in from: | NEA | Neasden | ||
Steam | B5 | 4-6-0 | on | 21/07/1931 | 6070 | Transfer in from: | LIN | Lincoln | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/07/1931 | 6215 | Transfer out to: | KEA | Keadby | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 09/08/1931 | 5073 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/08/1931 | 6250 | Transfer out to: | KEA | Keadby | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 29/10/1931 | 2967 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 06/11/1931 | 2967 | Transfer out to: | LIN | Lincoln | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 07/11/1931 | 5956 | Transfer in from: | KEA | Keadby | ||
Steam | B3 | 4-6-0 | on | 14/11/1931 | 6165 | Transfer out to: | NEA | Neasden | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 22/12/1931 | 6237 | Transfer out to: | KEA | Keadby | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 17/03/1932 | 6568 | Transfer in from: | KEA | Keadby | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 17/03/1932 | 6362 | Transfer out to: | KEA | Keadby | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 09/04/1932 | 6518 | Transfer in from: | KEA | Keadby | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 14/04/1932 | 6366 | Transfer out to: | KEA | Keadby | ||
Steam | B3 | 4-6-0 | on | 03/06/1932 | 6165 | Transfer in from: | NEA | Neasden | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 11/06/1932 | 5085 | Transfer out to: | KEA | Keadby | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 11/06/1932 | 5139 | Transfer out to: | KEA | Keadby | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 11/06/1932 | 6515 | Transfer out to: | KEA | Keadby | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 11/06/1932 | 6518 | Transfer out to: | FRO | Frodingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 11/06/1932 | 6568 | Transfer out to: | FRO | Frodingham | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 05/08/1932 | 1277 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 27/08/1932 | 5078 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 09/09/1932 | 1277 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | on | 15/09/1932 | 5273 | Transfer out to: | FRO | Frodingham | ||
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | on | 20/09/1932 | 5369 | Transfer out to: | FRO | Frodingham | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 20/10/1932 | 5078 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B4 | 4-6-0 | on | 15/12/1932 | 6095 | Transfer in from: | NEA | Neasden | ||
Steam | B3 | 4-6-0 | on | 16/12/1932 | 6167 | Transfer out to: | NEA | Neasden | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/12/1932 | 6240 | Transfer out to: | TUX | Tuxford | ||
Steam | C5 | 4-4-2 | on | 28/12/1932 | 5259 | Transfer in from: | LIN | Lincoln | ||
Steam | B4 | 4-6-0 | on | 16/03/1933 | 6103 | Transfer in from: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | B4 | 4-6-0 | on | 18/03/1933 | 6101 | Transfer in from: | COP | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ||
Steam | B3 | 4-6-0 | on | 20/03/1933 | 6169 | Transfer out to: | NEA | Neasden | ||
Steam | B3 | 4-6-0 | on | 21/04/1933 | 6165 | Transfer out to: | NEA | Neasden | ||
Steam | B19 | 4-6-0 | on | 04/05/1933 | 5426 | Transfer in from: | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | ||
Steam | B4 | 4-6-0 | on | 09/05/1933 | 6095 | Transfer out to: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | C5 | 4-4-2 | on | 17/05/1933 | 5258 | Transfer in from: | LEI | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | C5 | 4-4-2 | on | 17/05/1933 | 5365 | Transfer in from: | LEI | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | C5 | 4-4-2 | on | 27/05/1933 | 5364 | Transfer in from: | LEI | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | B4 | 4-6-0 | on | 03/06/1933 | 6103 | Transfer out to: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | B19 | 4-6-0 | on | 10/06/1933 | 5425 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B3 | 4-6-0 | on | 17/06/1933 | 6169 | Transfer in from: | NEA | Neasden | ||
Steam | B19 | 4-6-0 | on | 27/06/1933 | 5423 | Transfer in from: | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | ||
Steam | B19 | 4-6-0 | on | 19/07/1933 | 5428 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B4 | 4-6-0 | on | 24/08/1933 | 6101 | Transfer out to: | COP | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ||
Steam | B3 | 4-6-0 | on | 18/09/1933 | 6169 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 19/09/1933 | 6558 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 22/09/1933 | 6562 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 22/09/1933 | 6563 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/02/1934 | 6629 | Transfer out to: | TUX | Tuxford | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/05/1934 | 6629 | Transfer in from: | TUX | Tuxford | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 01/09/1934 | 6571 | Transfer out to: | FRO | Frodingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 04/09/1934 | 5334 | Transfer out to: | FRO | Frodingham | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 27/11/1934 | 1277 | Transfer out to: | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1935 | 6367 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B19 | 4-6-0 | on | 18/02/1935 | 5428 | Transfer out to: | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | ||
Steam | B3 | 4-6-0 | on | 21/02/1935 | 6165 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B19 | 4-6-0 | on | 22/02/1935 | 5425 | Transfer out to: | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | ||
Steam | B19 | 4-6-0 | on | 27/02/1935 | 5426 | Transfer out to: | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | ||
Steam | B3 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/03/1935 | 6167 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B3 | 4-6-0 | on | 13/04/1935 | 6164 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 22/06/1935 | 1282 | Transfer out to: | LIN | Lincoln | ||
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | m/e | 12/1935 | 5368 | Transfer in from: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | B3 | 4-6-0 | on | 07/12/1935 | 6165 | Transfer out to: | NEA | Neasden | ||
Steam | B3 | 4-6-0 | on | 11/12/1935 | 6169 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 01/1936 | 5989 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1936 | 5476 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 05/01/1936 | 5477 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | on | 24/01/1936 | 5368 | Transfer in from: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | on | 24/01/1936 | 5368 | Transfer out to: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 22/06/1936 | 5063 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B5 | 4-6-0 | on | 30/06/1936 | 5187 | Transfer in from: | LIN | Lincoln | ||
Steam | B5 | 4-6-0 | on | 15/12/1936 | 6072 | Transfer in from: | LIN | Lincoln | ||
Steam | B5 | 4-6-0 | on | 03/02/1937 | 5181 | Transfer in from: | LIN | Lincoln | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/05/1937 | 5379 | Transfer out to: | TUX | Tuxford | ||
Steam | B4 | 4-6-0 | on | 06/07/1937 | 6104 | Transfer in from: | LIN | Lincoln | ||
Steam | B5 | 4-6-0 | on | 06/07/1937 | 5184 | Transfer out to: | LIN | Lincoln | ||
Steam | B4 | 4-6-0 | on | 07/07/1937 | 6095 | Transfer in from: | LIN | Lincoln | ||
Steam | B5 | 4-6-0 | on | 07/07/1937 | 6070 | Transfer out to: | LIN | Lincoln | ||
Steam | B5 | 4-6-0 | on | 02/09/1937 | 6070 | Transfer in from: | LIN | Lincoln | ||
Steam | B4 | 4-6-0 | on | 02/09/1937 | 6095 | Transfer out to: | LIN | Lincoln | ||
Steam | B5 | 4-6-0 | on | 03/09/1937 | 5184 | Transfer in from: | LIN | Lincoln | ||
Steam | B4 | 4-6-0 | on | 03/09/1937 | 6104 | Transfer out to: | LIN | Lincoln | ||
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | on | 29/10/1937 | 5367 | Transfer out to: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | on | 11/11/1937 | 5370 | Transfer in from: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 07/01/1938 | 6144 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 08/01/1938 | 5162 | Transfer out to: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 17/01/1938 | 6633 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | B5 | 4-6-0 | on | 16/05/1938 | 6070 | Transfer out to: | LIN | Lincoln | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 29/06/1938 | 5476 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B3 | 4-6-0 | on | 28/11/1938 | 6165 | Transfer in from: | NEA | Neasden | ||
Steam | B3 | 4-6-0 | on | 29/11/1938 | 6167 | Transfer out to: | NEA | Neasden | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 30/12/1938 | 5001 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 11/01/1939 | 6558 | Transfer out to: | RET | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 17/03/1939 | 5034 | Transfer in from: | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 18/03/1939 | 1270 | Transfer out to: | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | ||
Steam | A7 | 4-6-2T | on | 03/05/1939 | 1129 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | A7 | 4-6-2T | on | 06/06/1939 | 1129 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 10/06/1939 | 6517 | Transfer out to: | RET | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 04/07/1939 | 5956 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B19 | 4-6-0 | on | 20/07/1939 | 5426 | Transfer in from: | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | ||
Steam | B3 | 4-6-0 | on | 21/07/1939 | 6169 | Transfer out to: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | B19 | 4-6-0 | on | 23/07/1939 | 5428 | Transfer in from: | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | ||
Steam | B19 | 4-6-0 | on | 24/07/1939 | 5425 | Transfer in from: | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | ||
Steam | B3 | 4-6-0 | on | 24/07/1939 | 6164 | Transfer out to: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | B3 | 4-6-0 | on | 25/07/1939 | 6165 | Transfer out to: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 13/09/1939 | 5085 | Transfer in from: | FRO | Frodingham | ||
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | on | 26/10/1939 | 5336 | Transfer out to: | NEA | Neasden | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 28/02/1940 | 1492 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 28/02/1940 | 6367 | Transfer out to: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 04/03/1940 | 5473 | Transfer in from: | NEA | Neasden | ||
Steam | B5 | 4-6-0 | on | 15/03/1940 | 5184 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | B5 | 4-6-0 | on | 15/03/1940 | 6072 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | B5 | 4-6-0 | on | 18/03/1940 | 5181 | Transfer out to: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | B5 | 4-6-0 | on | 18/03/1940 | 5187 | Transfer out to: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 30/08/1940 | 5035 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 30/08/1940 | 5475 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 30/08/1940 | 5395 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 30/08/1940 | 6574 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 21/10/1940 | 6500 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 21/10/1940 | 6592 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 22/11/1940 | 6629 | Transfer in from: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 22/11/1940 | 6639 | Transfer in from: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 22/11/1940 | 6629 | Transfer out to: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 22/11/1940 | 6639 | Transfer out to: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/11/1940 | 5393 | Transfer in from: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/11/1940 | 6562 | Transfer in from: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/11/1940 | 6633 | Transfer in from: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/11/1940 | 5393 | Transfer out to: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/11/1940 | 6562 | Transfer out to: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/11/1940 | 6633 | Transfer out to: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 25/11/1940 | 6621 | Transfer in from: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 25/11/1940 | 6621 | Transfer out to: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | on | 18/01/1941 | 5276 | Transfer out to: | NEA | Neasden | ||
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | on | 20/01/1941 | 5370 | Transfer out to: | NEA | Neasden | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/05/1941 | 5001 | Transfer out to: | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/05/1941 | 6512 | Transfer out to: | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 04/10/1941 | 6140 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 05/10/1941 | 753 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 05/10/1941 | 754 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 16/10/1941 | 6140 | Transfer in from: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 16/10/1941 | 6374 | Transfer out to: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/10/1941 | 783 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 03/05/1942 | 5163 | Transfer out to: | LIN | Lincoln | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 07/05/1942 | 6140 | Transfer out to: | LIN | Lincoln | ||
Steam | B19 | 4-6-0 | on | 28/05/1942 | 5425 | Transfer out to: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | B19 | 4-6-0 | on | 29/05/1942 | 5426 | Transfer out to: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | B19 | 4-6-0 | on | 19/06/1942 | 5425 | Transfer in from: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | B19 | 4-6-0 | on | 28/06/1942 | 5426 | Transfer in from: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 05/07/1942 | 5035 | Transfer out to: | LIN | Lincoln | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 05/07/1942 | 5473 | Transfer out to: | LIN | Lincoln | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 05/07/1942 | 5477 | Transfer out to: | LIN | Lincoln | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/07/1942 | 6621 | Transfer out to: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/07/1942 | 6639 | Transfer out to: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 21/07/1942 | 6629 | Transfer out to: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 09/08/1942 | 5477 | Transfer in from: | LIN | Lincoln | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/11/1942 | 5035 | Transfer in from: | LIN | Lincoln | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/11/1942 | 5473 | Transfer in from: | LIN | Lincoln | ||
Steam | B19 | 4-6-0 | on | 21/11/1942 | 5427 | Transfer in from: | LIN | Lincoln | ||
Steam | B19 | 4-6-0 | on | 21/11/1942 | 5423 | Transfer out to: | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | ||
Steam | B19 | 4-6-0 | on | 21/11/1942 | 5426 | Transfer out to: | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | ||
Steam | B19 | 4-6-0 | on | 13/12/1942 | 5424 | Transfer in from: | LIN | Lincoln | ||
Steam | B19 | 4-6-0 | on | 13/12/1942 | 5426 | Transfer in from: | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | ||
Steam | B19 | 4-6-0 | on | 13/12/1942 | 5428 | Transfer out to: | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/01/1943 | 6633 | Transfer out to: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 21/01/1943 | 6562 | Transfer out to: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 31/01/1943 | 5393 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | on | 18/02/1943 | 5337 | Transfer out to: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | on | 13/03/1943 | 5368 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 03/05/1943 | 5034 | Transfer out to: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 03/05/1943 | 5035 | Transfer out to: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 03/05/1943 | 5467 | Transfer out to: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 03/05/1943 | 5477 | Transfer out to: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 03/05/1943 | 5478 | Transfer out to: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 29/05/1943 | 5473 | Transfer out to: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 14/07/1943 | 6220 | Transfer in from: | DFU | Dunfermline Upper | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 16/07/1943 | 6370 | Transfer in from: | ABD | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 22/07/1943 | 6286 | Transfer in from: | ABD | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 22/07/1943 | 6351 | Transfer in from: | 29B | Stirling | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 24/07/1943 | 6291 | Transfer in from: | ABD | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 09/08/1943 | 5057 | Transfer out to: | RET | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 09/08/1943 | 5085 | Transfer out to: | RET | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 24/10/1943 | 5475 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 09/01/1944 | 6220 | Transfer out to: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 09/01/1944 | 6278 | Transfer out to: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 09/01/1944 | 6291 | Transfer out to: | TUX | Tuxford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 23/01/1944 | 1494 | Transfer out to: | LIN | Lincoln | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-8-0T | on | 09/05/1944 | 5070 | Transfer in from: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-8-0T | on | 09/05/1944 | 6077 | Transfer in from: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 21/05/1944 | 6334 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 11/06/1944 | 6631 | Transfer in from: | WHL | West Hartlepool | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-8-0T | on | 28/08/1944 | 5048 | Transfer in from: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/09/1944 | 6286 | Transfer out to: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/09/1944 | 6370 | Transfer out to: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 08/09/1944 | 6329 | Transfer out to: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-8-0T | on | 13/09/1944 | 6077 | Transfer out to: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-8-0T | on | 01/10/1944 | 5048 | Transfer out to: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 15/10/1944 | 6291 | Transfer in from: | TUX | Tuxford | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-8-0T | on | 15/10/1944 | 5070 | Transfer out to: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | B19 | 4-6-0 | on | 22/12/1944 | 5426 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B3 | 4-6-0 | on | 16/04/1945 | 6165 | Transfer in from: | NEA | Neasden | ||
Steam | B3 | 4-6-0 | on | 16/04/1945 | 6169 | Transfer in from: | NEA | Neasden | ||
Steam | B19 | 4-6-0 | on | 20/04/1945 | 5428 | Transfer in from: | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | B19 | 4-6-0 | on | 05/05/1945 | 5423 | Transfer in from: | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 17/06/1945 | 1450 | Transfer in from: | LIN | Lincoln | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 17/06/1945 | 1494 | Transfer in from: | LIN | Lincoln | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 17/06/1945 | 2966 | Transfer in from: | LIN | Lincoln | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 16/09/1945 | 5001 | Transfer in from: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 16/09/1945 | 5102 | Transfer in from: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 16/09/1945 | 5133 | Transfer in from: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 16/09/1945 | 6304 | Transfer in from: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 16/09/1945 | 6319 | Transfer in from: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 16/09/1945 | 6500 | Transfer in from: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 23/09/1945 | 1494 | Transfer out to: | LIN | Lincoln | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 21/10/1945 | 1450 | Transfer out to: | LIN | Lincoln | ||
Steam | B19 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/12/1945 | 5424 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 09/12/1945 | 5405 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 09/12/1945 | 6264 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 09/12/1945 | 6325 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 09/12/1945 | 6353 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 09/12/1945 | 2966 | Transfer out to: | LIN | Lincoln | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/12/1945 | 6188 | Transfer in from: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/12/1945 | 6200 | Transfer in from: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/05/1946 | 5001 | Transfer out to: | FRO | Frodingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/05/1946 | 5403 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/05/1946 | 5405 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/05/1946 | 6188 | Transfer out to: | FRO | Frodingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/05/1946 | 6200 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/05/1946 | 6264 | Transfer out to: | FRO | Frodingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/05/1946 | 6291 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/05/1946 | 6304 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/05/1946 | 6319 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/05/1946 | 6351 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/05/1946 | 6353 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/05/1946 | 6500 | Transfer out to: | FRO | Frodingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/07/1946 | 3509 | Transfer out to: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/07/1946 | 3510 | Transfer out to: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 22/12/1946 | 4734 | Transfer in from: | LIN | Lincoln | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 22/12/1946 | 4827 | Transfer in from: | LIN | Lincoln | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 22/12/1946 | 4828 | Transfer in from: | LIN | Lincoln | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 22/12/1946 | 4937 | Transfer in from: | LIN | Lincoln | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 22/12/1946 | 4971 | Transfer in from: | LIN | Lincoln | ||
Steam | C5 | 4-4-2 | on | 31/12/1946 | 2895 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | C5 | 4-4-2 | on | 11/04/1947 | 2896 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B19 | 4-6-0 | on | 19/04/1947 | 1490 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B19 | 4-6-0 | on | 19/04/1947 | 1493 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 27/04/1947 | 1720 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 27/04/1947 | 1722 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 27/04/1947 | 1724 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 27/04/1947 | 1727 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 27/04/1947 | 1728 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 27/04/1947 | 1733 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 27/04/1947 | 1735 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 27/04/1947 | 1739 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 27/04/1947 | 4734 | Transfer out to: | LIN | Lincoln | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 27/04/1947 | 4827 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 27/04/1947 | 4828 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 27/04/1947 | 4937 | Transfer out to: | LIN | Lincoln | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 27/04/1947 | 4971 | Transfer out to: | LIN | Lincoln | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 17/05/1947 | 1079 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 17/05/1947 | 1082 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 24/05/1947 | 1195 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | B3 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/06/1947 | 1494 | Transfer out to: | LIN | Lincoln | ||
Steam | B3 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/06/1947 | 1496 | Transfer out to: | LIN | Lincoln | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 12/06/1947 | 1202 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 16/06/1947 | 1142 | Transfer in from: | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 19/06/1947 | 1204 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | B3 | 4-6-0 | on | 26/06/1947 | 1498 | Transfer in from: | NEA | Neasden | ||
Steam | B3 | 4-6-0 | on | 28/06/1947 | 1495 | Transfer in from: | NEA | Neasden | ||
Steam | B19 | 4-6-0 | on | 04/07/1947 | 1491 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B3 | 4-6-0 | on | 14/07/1947 | 1497 | Transfer in from: | NEA | Neasden | ||
Steam | C5 | 4-4-2 | on | 25/08/1947 | 2898 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B3 | 4-6-0 | on | 27/09/1947 | 1495 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 04/10/1947 | 3634 | Transfer in from: | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 04/10/1947 | 3692 | Transfer in from: | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 04/10/1947 | 3902 | Transfer in from: | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 04/10/1947 | 3917 | Transfer in from: | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | B19 | 4-6-0 | on | 14/11/1947 | 1492 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B3 | 4-6-0 | on | 31/12/1947 | 1498 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | C5 | 4-4-2 | on | 31/12/1947 | 2897 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1800 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1803 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1806 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1836 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1837 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1838 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1842 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1845 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1891 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1912 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1963 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D3 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2132 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D3 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2139 | Snapshot | SEL | Selby | ||
Steam | Large/Scottish Director | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2660 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Large/Scottish Director | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2661 | Snapshot | NEA | Neasden | ||
Steam | Large/Scottish Director | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2662 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Large/Scottish Director | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2663 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Large/Scottish Director | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2664 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Large/Scottish Director | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2665 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Large/Scottish Director | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2666 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Large/Scottish Director | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2667 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Large/Scottish Director | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2668 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Large/Scottish Director | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2669 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Large/Scottish Director | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2670 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | C4 | 4-4-2 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2902 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | C4 | 4-4-2 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2903 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | on | 01/01/1948 | 71463 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | on | 01/01/1948 | 71464 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | on | 01/01/1948 | 71465 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | on | 01/01/1948 | 8006 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | on | 01/01/1948 | 8009 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | on | 01/01/1948 | 8012 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | on | 01/01/1948 | 8013 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | on | 01/01/1948 | 8018 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | on | 01/01/1948 | 8020 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | on | 01/01/1948 | 8022 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | on | 01/01/1948 | 8026 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | on | 01/01/1948 | 8028 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | on | 01/01/1948 | 8030 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | on | 01/01/1948 | 8033 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | on | 01/01/1948 | 8034 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | on | 01/01/1948 | 8068 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | on | 01/01/1948 | 8069 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | on | 01/01/1948 | 8070 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | on | 01/01/1948 | 8071 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | on | 01/01/1948 | 8072 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | on | 01/01/1948 | 8073 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | on | 01/01/1948 | 8074 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | on | 01/01/1948 | 8075 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | on | 01/01/1948 | 8076 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | on | 01/01/1948 | 8077 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | on | 01/01/1948 | 8078 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | on | 01/01/1948 | 8079 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | on | 01/01/1948 | 8080 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Y3 | 0-4-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8162 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Y3 | 0-4-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8179 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J62 | 0-6-0ST | on | 01/01/1948 | 8203 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J63 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8208 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J63 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8209 | Snapshot | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | J63 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8210 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9305 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9309 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9322 | Snapshot | LIN | Lincoln | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 03/01/1948 | 4320 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 06/02/1948 | 1284 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Y3 | 0-4-0T | w/e | 14/02/1948 | 8162 | Transfer out to: | BOS | Boston | ||
Steam | D3 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 03/04/1948 | 2139 | Transfer out to: | LTH | Louth | ||
Steam | Y3 | 0-4-0T | w/e | 10/04/1948 | 8162 | Transfer in from: | BOS | Boston | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 08/05/1948 | 4439 | Transfer in from: | LTH | Louth | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 08/05/1948 | 64320 | Transfer out to: | LTH | Louth | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 11/05/1948 | 61318 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | O3 | 2-8-0 | on | 30/05/1948 | 3479 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O3 | 2-8-0 | on | 30/05/1948 | 3480 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O3 | 2-8-0 | on | 30/05/1948 | 3482 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 30/05/1948 | 63055 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 03/06/1948 | 61325 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 3066 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 3075 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | O3 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 3475 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O3 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 3479 | Transfer in from: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | O3 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 3480 | Transfer in from: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | O3 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 3482 | Transfer in from: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 63064 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 63135 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 63139 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 63153 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | O3 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 3479 | Transfer out to: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | O3 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 3480 | Transfer out to: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | O3 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 3482 | Transfer out to: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/06/1948 | 77037 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/06/1948 | 77178 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/06/1948 | 78682 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/06/1948 | 78683 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Y3 | 0-4-0T | w/e | 12/06/1948 | 8179 | Transfer out to: | BOS | Boston | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 16/06/1948 | 61328 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | w/e | 26/06/1948 | 8006 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | w/e | 26/06/1948 | 8012 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | w/e | 10/07/1948 | 71464 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | w/e | 10/07/1948 | 8071 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | w/e | 10/07/1948 | 8079 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 14/08/1948 | 1802 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 14/08/1948 | 61905 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | Y3 | 0-4-0T | w/e | 21/08/1948 | 8179 | Transfer in from: | BOS | Boston | ||
Steam | C4 | 4-4-2 | w/e | 02/10/1948 | 2909 | Transfer in from: | BOS | Boston | ||
Steam | C4 | 4-4-2 | w/e | 02/10/1948 | 2919 | Transfer in from: | BOS | Boston | ||
Steam | C4 | 4-4-2 | w/e | 02/10/1948 | 2902 | Transfer out to: | BOS | Boston | ||
Steam | C4 | 4-4-2 | w/e | 02/10/1948 | 2903 | Transfer out to: | LIN | Lincoln | ||
Steam | J62 | 0-6-0ST | m/e | 02/1949 | 68203 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Y3 | 0-4-0T | w/e | 05/02/1949 | 68179 | Transfer out to: | BOS | Boston | ||
Steam | J63 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 05/03/1949 | 8207 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Y3 | 0-4-0T | w/e | 02/04/1949 | 68179 | Transfer in from: | BOS | Boston | ||
Steam | B3 | 4-6-0 | on | 14/04/1949 | 61497 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 01/05/1949 | 1739 | Transfer out to: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 01/05/1949 | 61735 | Transfer out to: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 07/05/1949 | 61825 | Transfer in from: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 07/05/1949 | 61827 | Transfer in from: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | D3 | 4-4-0 | m/e | 07/1949 | 62132 | Transfer out to: | LTH | Louth | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/11/1949 | 90118 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/11/1949 | 90275 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 03/12/1949 | 90118 | Transfer in from: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 03/12/1949 | 90275 | Transfer in from: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 03/12/1949 | 90118 | Transfer out to: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 03/12/1949 | 90275 | Transfer out to: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 10/12/1949 | 63917 | Transfer out to: | FRO | Frodingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/12/1949 | 63651 | Transfer in from: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/12/1949 | 63738 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/12/1949 | 63802 | Transfer in from: | FRO | Frodingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/12/1949 | 63819 | Transfer in from: | TUX | Tuxford | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/12/1949 | 63836 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/12/1949 | 3679 | Transfer out to: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/12/1949 | 63634 | Transfer out to: | TUX | Tuxford | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/12/1949 | 63692 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/12/1949 | 63902 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 24/12/1949 | 63651 | Transfer in from: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 24/12/1949 | 63738 | Transfer in from: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 24/12/1949 | 63802 | Transfer in from: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 24/12/1949 | 63819 | Transfer in from: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 24/12/1949 | 63836 | Transfer in from: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 24/12/1949 | 63651 | Transfer out to: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 24/12/1949 | 63738 | Transfer out to: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 24/12/1949 | 63802 | Transfer out to: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 24/12/1949 | 63819 | Transfer out to: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 24/12/1949 | 63836 | Transfer out to: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 26/03/1950 | 69800 | Transfer in from: | NEA | Neasden | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 26/03/1950 | 69808 | Transfer in from: | NEA | Neasden | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 26/03/1950 | 69819 | Transfer in from: | NEA | Neasden | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 21/04/1950 | 61365 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 24/04/1950 | 61366 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 21/05/1950 | 61406 | Transfer in from: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 10/06/1950 | 61407 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 13/06/1950 | 61408 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1950 | 61409 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 18/06/1950 | 61190 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 18/06/1950 | 61191 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/06/1950 | 63066 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 25/06/1950 | 3586 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 25/06/1950 | 3616 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 25/06/1950 | 3624 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 25/06/1950 | 3647 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 25/06/1950 | 3657 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 25/06/1950 | 3693 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 25/06/1950 | 63593 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 25/06/1950 | 63607 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 25/06/1950 | 63621 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 25/06/1950 | 63692 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 25/06/1950 | 63698 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O3 | 2-8-0 | on | 25/06/1950 | 63479 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O3 | 2-8-0 | on | 25/06/1950 | 63482 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 3586 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 3616 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 61190 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 61191 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 63593 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 63607 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 63621 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 63692 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 63698 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 3586 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 3616 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 61190 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 61191 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 63055 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 63064 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | O3 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 63475 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O3 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 63480 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 63593 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 63607 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 63621 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 63692 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 63698 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 90118 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 90275 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 06/08/1950 | 69808 | Transfer out to: | 40F | Boston | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 06/08/1950 | 69819 | Transfer out to: | 40F | Boston | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 08/10/1950 | 90075 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | Large/Scottish Director | 4-4-0 | on | 22/10/1950 | 62662 | Transfer out to: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | Large/Scottish Director | 4-4-0 | on | 22/10/1950 | 62666 | Transfer out to: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | C4 | 4-4-2 | on | 17/11/1950 | 62909 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | C4 | 4-4-2 | on | 22/11/1950 | 62919 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Large/Scottish Director | 4-4-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 62668 | Transfer out to: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | Large/Scottish Director | 4-4-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 62669 | Transfer out to: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 08/12/1950 | 61372 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 26/12/1950 | 61373 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Y3 | 0-4-0T | m/e | 31/12/1950 | 68171 | Transfer in from: | 40F | Boston | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 07/01/1951 | 61740 | Transfer in from: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 14/01/1951 | 61733 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Steam | Y3 | 0-4-0T | 4w/e | 20/01/1951 | 68171 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | Y3 | 0-4-0T | 4w/e | 20/01/1951 | 68171 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | Large/Scottish Director | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 27/01/1951 | 62664 | Transfer out to: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | Large/Scottish Director | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 27/01/1951 | 62667 | Transfer out to: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 61740 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 61740 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 12/02/1951 | 61374 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 23/02/1951 | 61375 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Large/Scottish Director | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 24/02/1951 | 62660 | Transfer out to: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | Large/Scottish Director | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 24/02/1951 | 62661 | Transfer out to: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 04/03/1951 | 61373 | Transfer out to: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 11/03/1951 | 61730 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 11/03/1951 | 61722 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 24/03/1951 | 90162 | Transfer out to: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 24/03/1951 | 90460 | Transfer out to: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 24/03/1951 | 90647 | Transfer out to: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | m/e | 31/03/1951 | 61730 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | m/e | 31/03/1951 | 61730 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | Y3 | 0-4-0T | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 68171 | Transfer out to: | 40F | Boston | ||
Steam | Y3 | 0-4-0T | w/e | 05/05/1951 | 68171 | Transfer in from: | 40F | Boston | ||
Steam | Y3 | 0-4-0T | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 68171 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | Y3 | 0-4-0T | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 68171 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 90646 | Transfer out to: | 36C | Frodingham | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 20/05/1951 | 61736 | Transfer in from: | 40F | Boston | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 20/05/1951 | 61739 | Transfer in from: | 40F | Boston | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/05/1951 | 63601 | Transfer in from: | FRO | Frodingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/05/1951 | 63649 | Transfer in from: | FRO | Frodingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/05/1951 | 63832 | Transfer in from: | FRO | Frodingham | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 26/05/1951 | 61736 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 26/05/1951 | 61739 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 26/05/1951 | 63601 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 26/05/1951 | 63649 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 26/05/1951 | 63832 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 26/05/1951 | 61736 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 26/05/1951 | 61739 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 26/05/1951 | 63601 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 26/05/1951 | 63649 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 26/05/1951 | 63832 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 26/05/1951 | 90133 | Transfer out to: | 36C | Frodingham | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 26/05/1951 | 90456 | Transfer out to: | 36C | Frodingham | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 27/05/1951 | 61089 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/06/1951 | 61089 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 02/06/1951 | 61839 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 02/06/1951 | 61956 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/06/1951 | 61089 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 17/06/1951 | 61373 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 23/06/1951 | 61373 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 5w/e | 23/06/1951 | 61839 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 5w/e | 23/06/1951 | 61956 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 23/06/1951 | 61373 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 5w/e | 23/06/1951 | 61839 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 5w/e | 23/06/1951 | 61956 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 24/06/1951 | 61089 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 08/07/1951 | 61379 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | Y3 | 0-4-0T | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 68162 | Transfer out to: | 6E | Wrexham Rhosddu | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 3w/e | 28/07/1951 | 61379 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 3w/e | 28/07/1951 | 61379 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | Y3 | 0-4-0T | 4w/e | 18/08/1951 | 68171 | Transfer out to: | 40F | Boston | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 08/09/1951 | 90001 | Transfer in from: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 08/09/1951 | 90010 | Transfer in from: | 91W | To Western Region / GWR | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 08/09/1951 | 90025 | Transfer in from: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 08/09/1951 | 90052 | Transfer in from: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 08/09/1951 | 90069 | Transfer in from: | 91W | To Western Region / GWR | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 08/09/1951 | 90483 | Transfer in from: | 91W | To Western Region / GWR | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 08/09/1951 | 90485 | Transfer in from: | 91W | To Western Region / GWR | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 08/09/1951 | 90492 | Transfer in from: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 16/09/1951 | 63620 | Transfer in from: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 16/09/1951 | 63770 | Transfer in from: | 53C | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 16/09/1951 | 63823 | Transfer in from: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 16/09/1951 | 63881 | Transfer in from: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 22/09/1951 | 63620 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 22/09/1951 | 63770 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 22/09/1951 | 63823 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 22/09/1951 | 63881 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 22/09/1951 | 90001 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 22/09/1951 | 90025 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 22/09/1951 | 90052 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 22/09/1951 | 90346 | Transfer in from: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 22/09/1951 | 90460 | Transfer in from: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 22/09/1951 | 90492 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 22/09/1951 | 63620 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 22/09/1951 | 63770 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 22/09/1951 | 63823 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 22/09/1951 | 63881 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 22/09/1951 | 90001 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 22/09/1951 | 90025 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 22/09/1951 | 90052 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 22/09/1951 | 90492 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 30/09/1951 | 61107 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 06/10/1951 | 61107 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 06/10/1951 | 61107 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 21/10/1951 | 61098 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 21/10/1951 | 61130 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 21/10/1951 | 61144 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 21/10/1951 | 61175 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 21/10/1951 | 61191 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 21/10/1951 | 61372 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 21/10/1951 | 61373 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 21/10/1951 | 61375 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 27/10/1951 | 61098 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 27/10/1951 | 61130 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 27/10/1951 | 61144 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 27/10/1951 | 61175 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 27/10/1951 | 61098 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 27/10/1951 | 61130 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 27/10/1951 | 61144 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 27/10/1951 | 61175 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 11/11/1951 | 61107 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 02/12/1951 | 63658 | Transfer in from: | 40E | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 02/12/1951 | 63807 | Transfer in from: | 40E | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 02/12/1951 | 63900 | Transfer in from: | 40E | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 02/12/1951 | 63908 | Transfer in from: | 40E | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 09/12/1951 | 63586 | Transfer out to: | 36B | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 09/12/1951 | 63593 | Transfer out to: | 36B | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 09/12/1951 | 63693 | Transfer out to: | 36B | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 09/12/1951 | 63698 | Transfer out to: | 36B | Mexborough | ||
Steam | Y3 | 0-4-0T | on | 17/12/1951 | 68179 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 61807 | Transfer in from: | LIN | Lincoln | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 63658 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 63807 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 63900 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 63908 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 64445 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 90285 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 90583 | Transfer in from: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 90594 | Transfer in from: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 63658 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 63807 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 63900 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 63908 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 68013 | Transfer out to: | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 68030 | Transfer out to: | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 68034 | Transfer out to: | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 90001 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 90052 | Transfer out to: | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 90346 | Transfer out to: | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 90460 | Transfer out to: | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 19/01/1952 | 69287 | Transfer in from: | LIN | Lincoln | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/01/1952 | 64445 | Transfer out to: | 39B | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 69287 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | J63 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 68209 | Transfer out to: | 6E | Wrexham Rhosddu | ||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 69287 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 31/01/1952 | 90485 | Transfer out to: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 10/02/1952 | 69820 | Transfer in from: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 5w/e | 16/02/1952 | 61807 | Transfer out to: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 69820 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 64296 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 69820 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | Y3 | 0-4-0T | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 68174 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 11/05/1952 | 63729 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 63729 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 63729 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 68893 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 68926 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | 5w/e | 21/06/1952 | 68893 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | 5w/e | 21/06/1952 | 68926 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | 5w/e | 21/06/1952 | 68893 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | 5w/e | 21/06/1952 | 68926 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 5w/e | 21/06/1952 | 69287 | Transfer out to: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 61963 | Transfer out to: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/07/1952 | 63575 | Transfer in from: | 39A | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 17/08/1952 | 63915 | Transfer in from: | 39A | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 63575 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 63915 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 63575 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 63915 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 22/09/1952 | 63666 | Transfer in from: | 36B | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 22/09/1952 | 63828 | Transfer in from: | 36B | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 63666 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 63828 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 63666 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 63828 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 05/10/1952 | 63666 | Transfer out to: | 36B | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 05/10/1952 | 63828 | Transfer out to: | 36B | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 09/11/1952 | 63823 | Transfer out to: | 40D | Tuxford | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 15/11/1952 | 64307 | Transfer in from: | 40D | Tuxford | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 64307 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 64307 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 25/01/1953 | 61739 | Transfer out to: | 62A | Thornton Junction | ||
Steam | Large/Scottish Director | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 14/02/1953 | 62666 | Transfer in from: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | Large/Scottish Director | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 14/02/1953 | 62667 | Transfer in from: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 90069 | Transfer out to: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 15/03/1953 | 61728 | Transfer out to: | 40F | Boston | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 15/03/1953 | 63621 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 15/03/1953 | 63624 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 15/03/1953 | 63807 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | Large/Scottish Director | 4-4-0 | 5w/e | 21/03/1953 | 62667 | Transfer out to: | 40F | Boston | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 25/03/1953 | 61739 | Transfer in from: | 62A | Thornton Junction | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 29/03/1953 | 61202 | Transfer out to: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | Y3 | 0-4-0T | w/e | 06/04/1953 | 68174 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 90223 | Transfer in from: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 61845 | Transfer out to: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | Y3 | 0-4-0T | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 68185 | Transfer in from: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/06/1953 | 63621 | Transfer in from: | 40E | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/06/1953 | 63624 | Transfer in from: | 40E | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/06/1953 | 63745 | Transfer in from: | FRO | Frodingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/06/1953 | 63807 | Transfer in from: | 40E | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 21/06/1953 | 61167 | Transfer in from: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 21/06/1953 | 61168 | Transfer in from: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 25/07/1953 | 68946 | Transfer in from: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 25/07/1953 | 68979 | Transfer in from: | 36B | Mexborough | ||
Steam | Large/Scottish Director | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 25/07/1953 | 62666 | Transfer out to: | 36B | Mexborough | ||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 25/07/1953 | 69309 | Transfer out to: | 40C | Louth | ||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 25/07/1953 | 69322 | Transfer out to: | 40C | Louth | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 25/07/1953 | 90025 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 13/09/1953 | 61407 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 20/09/1953 | 61204 | Transfer out to: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/09/1953 | 63575 | Transfer out to: | 39A | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/09/1953 | 63601 | Transfer out to: | 39A | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/09/1953 | 63607 | Transfer out to: | 39B | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/09/1953 | 63620 | Transfer out to: | 39B | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/09/1953 | 63621 | Transfer out to: | 39B | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/09/1953 | 63624 | Transfer out to: | 39B | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/09/1953 | 63647 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/09/1953 | 63649 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/09/1953 | 63657 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/09/1953 | 63658 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/09/1953 | 63729 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/09/1953 | 63745 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/09/1953 | 63807 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/09/1953 | 63832 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/09/1953 | 63881 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/09/1953 | 63908 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/09/1953 | 63915 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 90010 | Transfer out to: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 90483 | Transfer out to: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 04/10/1953 | 61167 | Transfer out to: | 36B | Mexborough | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 24/10/1953 | 90003 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 24/10/1953 | 90029 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 24/10/1953 | 90035 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 24/10/1953 | 90055 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 24/10/1953 | 90083 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 24/10/1953 | 90087 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 24/10/1953 | 90131 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 24/10/1953 | 90145 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 24/10/1953 | 90175 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 24/10/1953 | 90203 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 24/10/1953 | 90221 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 24/10/1953 | 90224 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 24/10/1953 | 90275 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 24/10/1953 | 90280 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 24/10/1953 | 90294 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 24/10/1953 | 90298 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 24/10/1953 | 90302 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 24/10/1953 | 90393 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 24/10/1953 | 90431 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 24/10/1953 | 90442 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 24/10/1953 | 90453 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 24/10/1953 | 90471 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 24/10/1953 | 90477 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 24/10/1953 | 90508 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 24/10/1953 | 90510 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 24/10/1953 | 90660 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/10/1953 | 61827 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/10/1953 | 61842 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 24/10/1953 | 90474 | Transfer out to: | 38E | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | J63 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 26/10/1953 | 68208 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/11/1953 | 61365 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | Large/Scottish Director | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 21/11/1953 | 62670 | Transfer in from: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | S1 | 0-8-4T | 4w/e | 21/11/1953 | 69903 | Transfer in from: | 36B | Mexborough | ||
Steam | Large/Scottish Director | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 21/11/1953 | 62670 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | S1 | 0-8-4T | 4w/e | 23/01/1954 | 69904 | Transfer in from: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | S1 | 0-8-4T | on | 08/03/1954 | 69903 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 20/03/1954 | 68067 | Transfer in from: | 39A | Gorton | ||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 20/03/1954 | 68071 | Transfer in from: | 39A | Gorton | ||
Steam | S1 | 0-8-4T | 4w/e | 20/03/1954 | 69904 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 13/06/1954 | 61159 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 13/06/1954 | 61182 | Transfer in from: | 39A | Gorton | ||
Steam | Large/Scottish Director | 4-4-0 | 5w/e | 24/07/1954 | 62663 | Transfer out to: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 26/09/1954 | 69813 | Transfer in from: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 10/10/1954 | 61742 | Transfer in from: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 24/10/1954 | 61390 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 07/11/1954 | 69815 | Transfer in from: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 07/11/1954 | 61742 | Transfer out to: | 40F | Boston | ||
Steam | Large/Scottish Director | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 62665 | Transfer out to: | 9G | Northwich | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 6w/e | 25/12/1954 | 12127 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 6w/e | 25/12/1954 | 12133 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 6w/e | 25/12/1954 | 12134 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 02/01/1955 | 69813 | Transfer out to: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Diesel | D3/5 | 0-6-0 | on | 02/02/1955 | 13152 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | D3/5 | 0-6-0 | on | 07/02/1955 | 13153 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 13/02/1955 | 69812 | Transfer in from: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 13/02/1955 | 69821 | Transfer in from: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Diesel | D3/5 | 0-6-0 | on | 17/02/1955 | 13154 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | D3/5 | 0-6-0 | on | 17/02/1955 | 13155 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 20/02/1955 | 69804 | Transfer in from: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Diesel | D3/5 | 0-6-0 | on | 02/03/1955 | 13156 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | D3/5 | 0-6-0 | on | 18/03/1955 | 13157 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 19/03/1955 | 68893 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 19/03/1955 | 68979 | Transfer out to: | 34B | Hornsey | ||
Diesel | D3/5 | 0-6-0 | on | 25/03/1955 | 13158 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Y3 | 0-4-0T | on | 19/04/1955 | 68185 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Y3 | 0-4-0T | 5w/e | 23/04/1955 | 68169 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | 5w/e | 23/04/1955 | 68946 | Transfer out to: | 34B | Hornsey | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 23/04/1955 | 90087 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 23/04/1955 | 90492 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 23/04/1955 | 90508 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 24/04/1955 | 69804 | Transfer out to: | 40F | Boston | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 08/05/1955 | 61248 | Transfer in from: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 3w/e | 14/05/1955 | 61852 | Transfer in from: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 3w/e | 14/05/1955 | 61950 | Transfer in from: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 3w/e | 14/05/1955 | 90443 | Transfer in from: | 33A | Plaistow | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 3w/e | 14/05/1955 | 90668 | Transfer in from: | 33A | Plaistow | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 3w/e | 14/05/1955 | 90442 | Transfer out to: | 33A | Plaistow | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | on | 04/07/1955 | 64307 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Y3 | 0-4-0T | on | 04/07/1955 | 68169 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 10/07/1955 | 61720 | Transfer out to: | 40F | Boston | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 10/07/1955 | 61724 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 10/07/1955 | 61739 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 10/07/1955 | 69821 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 24/07/1955 | 63615 | Transfer in from: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 24/07/1955 | 63644 | Transfer in from: | 40E | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 24/07/1955 | 63665 | Transfer in from: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 24/07/1955 | 63750 | Transfer in from: | 40E | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 24/07/1955 | 63759 | Transfer in from: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 24/07/1955 | 63837 | Transfer in from: | 40E | Langwith Junction | ||
Diesel | D3/5 | 0-6-0 | on | 12/08/1955 | 13159 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | D3/5 | 0-6-0 | on | 16/08/1955 | 13160 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 20/08/1955 | 90055 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 20/08/1955 | 90275 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 20/08/1955 | 90302 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 20/08/1955 | 90431 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 20/08/1955 | 90594 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 20/08/1955 | 90660 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 28/08/1955 | 69803 | Transfer in from: | 40F | Boston | ||
Diesel | D3/5 | 0-6-0 | on | 07/09/1955 | 13161 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 11/09/1955 | 69815 | Transfer out to: | 39A | Gorton | ||
Diesel | D3/5 | 0-6-0 | on | 16/09/1955 | 13162 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | D3/5 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 30/09/1955 | 13162 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 22/10/1955 | 11108 | Transfer in from: | 34A | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | 5w/e | 22/10/1955 | 68926 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 23/10/1955 | 69800 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 3w/e | 12/11/1955 | 69261 | Transfer in from: | 40F | Boston | ||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 3w/e | 12/11/1955 | 69269 | Transfer in from: | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 3w/e | 12/11/1955 | 69297 | Transfer in from: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | 3w/e | 12/11/1955 | 68020 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | 3w/e | 12/11/1955 | 68022 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 3w/e | 12/11/1955 | 69305 | Transfer out to: | 36B | Mexborough | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 17/12/1955 | 12127 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | DES1 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 21/01/1956 | 15001 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 21/01/1956 | 12133 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | on | 10/02/1956 | 11152 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | on | 17/02/1956 | 11153 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 18/02/1956 | 68950 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 18/02/1956 | 68963 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 18/02/1956 | 68965 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 18/02/1956 | 68967 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 18/02/1956 | 68977 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Diesel | D3/5 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/02/1956 | 13158 | Transfer out to: | 34A | Kings Cross | ||
Diesel | D3/5 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/02/1956 | 13159 | Transfer out to: | 34A | Kings Cross | ||
Diesel | D3/5 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/02/1956 | 13160 | Transfer out to: | 34A | Kings Cross | ||
Diesel | D3/5 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/02/1956 | 13161 | Transfer out to: | 34A | Kings Cross | ||
Diesel | DES1 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/02/1956 | 15001 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 19/02/1956 | 61281 | Transfer in from: | LIN | Lincoln | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 19/02/1956 | 69808 | Transfer in from: | 40F | Boston | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 19/02/1956 | 61248 | Transfer out to: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 26/02/1956 | 69813 | Transfer in from: | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 26/02/1956 | 63665 | Transfer out to: | 40D | Tuxford | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 26/02/1956 | 69808 | Transfer out to: | 40F | Boston | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | on | 06/03/1956 | 11154 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | D1/3 | 0-4-0 | on | 06/03/1956 | 11507 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 11/03/1956 | 69816 | Transfer in from: | 40F | Boston | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 11/03/1956 | 69812 | Transfer out to: | 40F | Boston | ||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 5w/e | 24/03/1956 | 69369 | Transfer in from: | 40F | Boston | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 24/03/1956 | 12134 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 5w/e | 24/03/1956 | 69269 | Transfer out to: | 40F | Boston | ||
Steam | J63 | 0-6-0T | on | 04/04/1956 | 68207 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | D2/7 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 25/05/1956 | 11117 | Transfer in from: | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 25/05/1956 | 11126 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | Large/Scottish Director | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 25/05/1956 | 62670 | Transfer out to: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Diesel | D1/3 | 0-4-0 | on | 28/05/1956 | 11508 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 06/06/1956 | 61727 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 3w/e | 16/06/1956 | 61802 | Transfer out to: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 24/06/1956 | 69803 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | m/e | 21/07/1956 | 68950 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 25/08/1956 | 68963 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 25/08/1956 | 69297 | Transfer out to: | 36D | Barnsley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 16/09/1956 | 63708 | Transfer in from: | 39B | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 16/09/1956 | 63860 | Transfer in from: | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 22/09/1956 | 68967 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 22/09/1956 | 90083 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 22/09/1956 | 90203 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 22/09/1956 | 90298 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 22/09/1956 | 90453 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 22/09/1956 | 90477 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 02/12/1956 | 69813 | Transfer out to: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 02/12/1956 | 69820 | Transfer out to: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 09/12/1956 | 69816 | Transfer out to: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Diesel | D2/5 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 15/12/1956 | 11177 | Transfer in from: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 15/12/1956 | 64320 | Transfer in from: | LTH | Louth | ||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | 4w/e | 15/12/1956 | 67398 | Transfer in from: | LTH | Louth | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 15/12/1956 | 68965 | Transfer out to: | 36C | Frodingham | ||
Diesel | D1/3 | 0-4-0 | 5w/e | 19/01/1957 | 11508 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | 5w/e | 19/01/1957 | 68977 | Transfer out to: | 36C | Frodingham | ||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | on | 02/02/1957 | 69369 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/02/1957 | 11124 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | D3/5 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/02/1957 | 13159 | Transfer in from: | 34A | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 16/02/1957 | 90383 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 16/02/1957 | 90674 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Diesel | D1/3 | 0-4-0 | 4w/e | 16/02/1957 | 11507 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | 4w/e | 16/02/1957 | 67398 | Transfer out to: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 17/02/1957 | 69821 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 17/02/1957 | 69824 | Transfer in from: | 32C | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 17/02/1957 | 69826 | Transfer in from: | 32C | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 17/02/1957 | 69829 | Transfer in from: | 32C | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 17/02/1957 | 61182 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J63 | 0-6-0T | on | 25/02/1957 | 68210 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | D2/5 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/03/1957 | 11180 | Transfer in from: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/03/1957 | 61838 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 16/03/1957 | 69261 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 20/04/1957 | 64365 | Transfer in from: | LIN | Lincoln | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 07/05/1957 | 61736 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | D3/5 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/05/1957 | 13158 | Transfer in from: | 34A | Kings Cross | ||
Diesel | D3/5 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/05/1957 | 13160 | Transfer in from: | 34A | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/05/1957 | 64386 | Transfer in from: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/05/1957 | 64439 | Transfer out to: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 18/05/1957 | 68068 | Transfer out to: | 39A | Gorton | ||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 18/05/1957 | 68071 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 16/06/1957 | 61778 | Transfer in from: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 16/06/1957 | 69821 | Transfer out to: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 20/08/1957 | 61730 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 19/10/1957 | 90088 | Transfer in from: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 19/10/1957 | 90438 | Transfer in from: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 19/10/1957 | 90657 | Transfer in from: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | on | 19/10/1957 | 64320 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 09/11/1957 | 90088 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 09/11/1957 | 90438 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 09/11/1957 | 90657 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 17/11/1957 | 61143 | Transfer in from: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/12/1957 | 61825 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | D3/5 | 0-6-0 | on | 05/01/1958 | 13161 | Transfer in from: | 34A | Kings Cross | ||
Diesel | D3/5 | 0-6-0 | on | 05/01/1958 | 13162 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | D3/5 | 0-6-0 | on | 05/01/1958 | 13163 | Transfer in from: | 34A | Kings Cross | ||
Diesel | D3/5 | 0-6-0 | on | 05/01/1958 | 13164 | Transfer in from: | 34A | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/01/1958 | 61866 | Transfer in from: | 38E | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/01/1958 | 61966 | Transfer in from: | 38E | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/01/1958 | 61837 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/01/1958 | 61852 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/01/1958 | 64365 | Transfer out to: | 36C | Frodingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 02/02/1958 | 63802 | Transfer out to: | 36D | Barnsley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 02/02/1958 | 63836 | Transfer out to: | 36D | Barnsley | ||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 08/02/1958 | 68069 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 08/03/1958 | 68033 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 13/04/1958 | 69824 | Transfer out to: | 34F | Grantham | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | on | 06/05/1958 | D2020 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | on | 27/05/1958 | D2021 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | on | 27/05/1958 | D2022 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/06/1958 | 61281 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 02/06/1958 | 69826 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 19/07/1958 | 68026 | Transfer out to: | 41J | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 19/07/1958 | 68080 | Transfer out to: | 41J | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 13/09/1958 | 90036 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 13/09/1958 | 90460 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 13/09/1958 | 90648 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/10/1958 | D2023 | Transfer in from: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 11/10/1958 | 11124 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 11/10/1958 | 11126 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | on | 13/11/1958 | D3637 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | 5w/e | 15/11/1958 | 68033 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 15/11/1958 | D2023 | Transfer out to: | 40F | Boston | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 5w/e | 15/11/1958 | 61806 | Transfer out to: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/11/1958 | 12123 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/11/1958 | 12124 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/11/1958 | 12125 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1958 | 12126 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1958 | 12133 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1958 | 12135 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/12/1958 | 63770 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 13/12/1958 | 90263 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | w/e | 13/12/1958 | 68028 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | w/e | 13/12/1958 | 68072 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | w/e | 13/12/1958 | 68076 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | w/e | 20/12/1958 | 68033 | Transfer out to: | 34B | Hornsey | ||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | w/e | 10/01/1959 | 68067 | Transfer out to: | 34B | Hornsey | ||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | w/e | 24/01/1959 | 68073 | Transfer out to: | 34B | Hornsey | ||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | w/e | 24/01/1959 | 68075 | Transfer out to: | 34B | Hornsey | ||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | w/e | 24/01/1959 | 68077 | Transfer out to: | 34B | Hornsey | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 07/02/1959 | 92039 | Transfer in from: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 07/02/1959 | 92193 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 07/02/1959 | 92194 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 07/02/1959 | 92195 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 07/02/1959 | 92196 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 07/02/1959 | 61800 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 07/02/1959 | 61803 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 07/02/1959 | 61836 | Transfer out to: | 41F | Mexborough | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 07/02/1959 | 61839 | Transfer out to: | 41F | Mexborough | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 21/02/1959 | 90223 | Transfer out to: | 34E | New England | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 01/03/1959 | 61745 | Transfer in from: | 40F | Boston | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 01/03/1959 | 61756 | Transfer in from: | BOS | Boston | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 01/03/1959 | 61763 | Transfer in from: | 40F | Boston | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 01/03/1959 | 61766 | Transfer in from: | 40F | Boston | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 01/03/1959 | 61767 | Transfer in from: | 40F | Boston | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 01/03/1959 | 61771 | Transfer in from: | 40F | Boston | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 01/03/1959 | 61773 | Transfer in from: | 40F | Boston | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 11/04/1959 | 92202 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 68078 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 23/06/1959 | D3707 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/06/1959 | D3708 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 10/07/1959 | D3709 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 09/08/1959 | 63819 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 15/08/1959 | 90263 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 15/08/1959 | 90648 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/09/1959 | 90162 | Transfer in from: | 41D | Canklow | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/09/1959 | 90411 | Transfer in from: | 41D | Canklow | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/09/1959 | 90145 | Transfer out to: | 41D | Canklow | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/09/1959 | 90471 | Transfer out to: | 41D | Canklow | ||
Diesel | D3/5 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 26/09/1959 | 13166 | Transfer in from: | 34A | Kings Cross | ||
Diesel | D3/5 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 26/09/1959 | D3165 | Transfer in from: | 34A | Kings Cross | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 26/09/1959 | D3637 | Transfer out to: | 34A | Kings Cross | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 26/09/1959 | D3707 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 09/10/1959 | 61778 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 15/11/1959 | 61763 | Transfer out to: | 34E | New England | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 22/11/1959 | 61248 | Transfer in from: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 22/11/1959 | 61284 | Transfer out to: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 29/11/1959 | 61026 | Transfer in from: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 29/11/1959 | 61409 | Transfer out to: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 06/12/1959 | 61185 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 06/12/1959 | 61142 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 13/12/1959 | 61114 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 13/12/1959 | 61390 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 03/01/1960 | 61235 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 09/01/1960 | 90162 | Transfer out to: | 41D | Canklow | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 09/01/1960 | 90411 | Transfer out to: | 41D | Canklow | ||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | w/e | 20/02/1960 | 68009 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 06/03/1960 | 61026 | Transfer out to: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 20/03/1960 | 61223 | Transfer in from: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 20/03/1960 | 61317 | Transfer in from: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 27/03/1960 | 61223 | Transfer out to: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 10/04/1960 | 63616 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 10/04/1960 | 63644 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 10/04/1960 | 63750 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 10/04/1960 | 63860 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 10/04/1960 | 63900 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 16/04/1960 | 90053 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 16/04/1960 | 90161 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 16/04/1960 | 90166 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 16/04/1960 | 90288 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 16/04/1960 | 90394 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 01/05/1960 | 63607 | Transfer in from: | 41J | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 01/05/1960 | 63634 | Transfer in from: | 40E | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 01/05/1960 | 63758 | Transfer in from: | 41J | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 16/05/1960 | 63643 | Transfer in from: | 41J | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 16/05/1960 | 63707 | Transfer in from: | 40E | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 30/05/1960 | 69829 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 12/06/1960 | 61740 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 12/06/1960 | 61756 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 12/06/1960 | 61766 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 12/06/1960 | 61767 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 25/06/1960 | 92148 | Transfer in from: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 10/07/1960 | 69820 | Transfer in from: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/07/1960 | D3442 | Transfer in from: | 34C | Hatfield | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/07/1960 | D3475 | Transfer in from: | 34C | Hatfield | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 06/08/1960 | 61877 | Transfer in from: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 06/08/1960 | 61914 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 13/08/1960 | 90648 | Transfer in from: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 13/08/1960 | 90288 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | w/e | 20/08/1960 | 68070 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | w/e | 20/08/1960 | 68074 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 04/09/1960 | 61771 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 04/09/1960 | 61773 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 92197 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 15/10/1960 | 90053 | Transfer out to: | 36C | Frodingham | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 15/10/1960 | 90161 | Transfer out to: | 36C | Frodingham | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 15/10/1960 | 90166 | Transfer out to: | 36C | Frodingham | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 15/10/1960 | 90648 | Transfer out to: | 36C | Frodingham | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 16/10/1960 | 61175 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 22/10/1960 | 90036 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 22/10/1960 | 90383 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 22/10/1960 | 90393 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 22/10/1960 | 90510 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 22/10/1960 | 90674 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | on | 06/11/1960 | D2303 | Transfer in from: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 12/11/1960 | D3442 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 14/11/1960 | 69820 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 25/11/1960 | 61745 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 30/11/1960 | 63643 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 03/12/1960 | 90460 | Transfer out to: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 10/12/1960 | 70039 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 17/12/1960 | 70040 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 24/12/1960 | 61944 | Transfer in from: | LIN | Lincoln | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 24/12/1960 | 61974 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 24/12/1960 | 70041 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 24/12/1960 | 61866 | Transfer out to: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 24/12/1960 | 61950 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | w/e | 15/04/1961 | 68018 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | on | 29/04/1961 | D3477 | Transfer in from: | 34D | Hitchin (GNR) | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | on | 29/04/1961 | D3478 | Transfer in from: | 34D | Hitchin (GNR) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/04/1961 | D3708 | Transfer out to: | 34D | Hitchin (GNR) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/04/1961 | D3709 | Transfer out to: | 34D | Hitchin (GNR) | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 15/07/1961 | 61950 | Transfer in from: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 15/07/1961 | 61960 | Transfer in from: | LIN | Lincoln | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 15/07/1961 | 61891 | Transfer out to: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 15/07/1961 | 61966 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 22/07/1961 | 90003 | Transfer out to: | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 22/07/1961 | 90224 | Transfer out to: | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 23/09/1961 | 61914 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 23/09/1961 | 92039 | Transfer out to: | 34E | New England | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 23/09/1961 | 92148 | Transfer out to: | 34E | New England | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 30/09/1961 | 70037 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 07/10/1961 | 70036 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 14/10/1961 | 70035 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 28/10/1961 | 70038 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 28/10/1961 | 61912 | Transfer out to: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 04/11/1961 | 61877 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 20/01/1962 | 61807 | Transfer in from: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 20/01/1962 | 61889 | Transfer in from: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 20/01/1962 | 61939 | Transfer in from: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 20/01/1962 | 61905 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 20/01/1962 | 61944 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 20/01/1962 | 61950 | Transfer out to: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 24/02/1962 | D2235 | Transfer out to: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | on | 28/02/1962 | D4087 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | on | 02/03/1962 | D4088 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | D2/5 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 17/03/1962 | D2400 | Transfer out to: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Diesel | D2/5 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 17/03/1962 | D2403 | Transfer out to: | 40F | Boston | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 24/05/1962 | 63758 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 18/06/1962 | 61079 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 02/07/1962 | 61974 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 06/08/1962 | 61379 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 16/09/1962 | 61114 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 16/09/1962 | 61130 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 16/09/1962 | 61235 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 16/09/1962 | 61317 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 16/09/1962 | 61956 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 16/09/1962 | 61960 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/09/1962 | 63607 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/09/1962 | 63615 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/09/1962 | 63651 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/09/1962 | 63692 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/09/1962 | 63707 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/09/1962 | 63738 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/09/1962 | 63837 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/09/1962 | 63878 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/09/1962 | 63634 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/09/1962 | 63708 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/09/1962 | 63759 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | on | 23/09/1962 | 64386 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 29/09/1962 | 90055 | Transfer in from: | 34E | New England | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 29/09/1962 | 90075 | Transfer in from: | 34E | New England | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 29/09/1962 | 90129 | Transfer in from: | 34E | New England | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 29/09/1962 | 90180 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 29/09/1962 | 90185 | Transfer in from: | 34E | New England | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 29/09/1962 | 90215 | Transfer in from: | 34E | New England | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 29/09/1962 | 90490 | Transfer in from: | 34E | New England | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 29/09/1962 | 90618 | Transfer in from: | 34E | New England | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 29/09/1962 | 90660 | Transfer in from: | 34E | New England | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 29/09/1962 | 90662 | Transfer in from: | 34E | New England | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 29/09/1962 | 92144 | Transfer in from: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 04/11/1962 | 61056 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 04/11/1962 | 61807 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 04/11/1962 | 61889 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 04/11/1962 | 61939 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 17/12/1962 | 61366 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 29/12/1962 | 61082 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 29/12/1962 | 61408 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 30/12/1962 | 61003 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 30/12/1962 | 61145 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 30/12/1962 | 61365 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 02/03/1963 | D3475 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 03/03/1963 | 61152 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 09/03/1963 | 92147 | Transfer in from: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 09/03/1963 | 92144 | Transfer out to: | 34E | New England | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | on | 05/05/1963 | D3478 | Transfer out to: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 11/05/1963 | 12137 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 11/05/1963 | D2026 | Transfer in from: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 18/05/1963 | D4087 | Transfer out to: | 34E | New England | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 92034 | Transfer in from: | 34E | New England | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 92035 | Transfer in from: | 34E | New England | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 92037 | Transfer in from: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 92038 | Transfer in from: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 70035 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 92200 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 92201 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 22/09/1963 | 61026 | Transfer in from: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 22/09/1963 | 61042 | Transfer in from: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 22/09/1963 | 61089 | Transfer in from: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 22/09/1963 | 61223 | Transfer in from: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 22/09/1963 | 61251 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 22/09/1963 | 61384 | Transfer in from: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 22/09/1963 | 61159 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 22/09/1963 | 61318 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 22/09/1963 | 61325 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 22/09/1963 | 61328 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 22/09/1963 | 61374 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 28/09/1963 | 90131 | Transfer out to: | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 28/09/1963 | 90280 | Transfer out to: | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 28/09/1963 | 90285 | Transfer out to: | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 28/09/1963 | 90583 | Transfer out to: | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 19/10/1963 | D3624 | Transfer in from: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 19/10/1963 | D2207 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 30/11/1963 | 92039 | Transfer in from: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 07/12/1963 | 70036 | Transfer out to: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 07/12/1963 | 70037 | Transfer out to: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 07/12/1963 | 70038 | Transfer out to: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 07/12/1963 | 70039 | Transfer out to: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 07/12/1963 | 70040 | Transfer out to: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 07/12/1963 | 70041 | Transfer out to: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 11/01/1964 | 92184 | Transfer in from: | 34E | New England | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 11/01/1964 | 92185 | Transfer in from: | 34E | New England | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/02/1964 | 90490 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 24/02/1964 | 61143 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 07/03/1964 | 90668 | Transfer out to: | 41D | Canklow | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 19/04/1964 | 61056 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 19/04/1964 | 61144 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 19/04/1964 | 61152 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 19/04/1964 | 61251 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 21/04/1964 | 90394 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 02/05/1964 | D1564 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 02/05/1964 | D1565 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 02/05/1964 | D1566 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 02/05/1964 | D1567 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 02/05/1964 | D1568 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 02/05/1964 | D1569 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 13/05/1964 | 90618 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 23/05/1964 | D1566 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 23/05/1964 | D1569 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | on | 31/05/1964 | 92034 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 06/1964 | 90129 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 13/06/1964 | D1758 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 14/06/1964 | 61179 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 14/06/1964 | 61389 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 14/06/1964 | 61392 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 20/06/1964 | D1568 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 92038 | Transfer out to: | 34E | New England | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 92039 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 92195 | Transfer out to: | 34E | New England | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 92200 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 92201 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/09/1964 | 90142 | Transfer in from: | 26B | Agecroft | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/09/1964 | 90242 | Transfer in from: | 8L | Aintree | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 11/10/1964 | 61185 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 24/10/1964 | D1565 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 24/10/1964 | D1758 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | on | 06/12/1964 | 92196 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/01/1965 | D1568 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/01/1965 | D1569 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/01/1965 | D5679 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/01/1965 | D5680 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/01/1965 | D5681 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/01/1965 | D5853 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/01/1965 | D5854 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/01/1965 | D1564 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/01/1965 | D1567 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 10/01/1965 | 61145 | Transfer out to: | 41D | Canklow | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 10/01/1965 | 61190 | Transfer out to: | 41D | Canklow | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 10/01/1965 | 61248 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 10/01/1965 | 61392 | Transfer out to: | 41D | Canklow | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 10/01/1965 | 61179 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 31/01/1965 | 90221 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 21/02/1965 | 92037 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 21/02/1965 | 92184 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 21/02/1965 | 92185 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 27/02/1965 | D1548 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 27/02/1965 | D1549 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 27/02/1965 | D1768 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 27/02/1965 | D1769 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 07/03/1965 | 61384 | Transfer out to: | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 14/03/1965 | 90055 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 14/03/1965 | 90180 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 14/03/1965 | 90185 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 28/03/1965 | 61370 | Transfer in from: | 41D | Canklow | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 04/1965 | 90175 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 04/1965 | 90215 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 04/04/1965 | 92147 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 10/04/1965 | D1568 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 01/05/1965 | D2233 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 01/05/1965 | D2234 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 09/05/1965 | 61195 | Transfer out to: | 36C | Frodingham | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 09/05/1965 | 61370 | Transfer out to: | 36C | Frodingham | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 09/05/1965 | 61389 | Transfer out to: | 36C | Frodingham | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 15/05/1965 | D5851 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 15/05/1965 | D5680 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 13/06/1965 | 92193 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 19/06/1965 | D5592 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 19/06/1965 | D5593 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 19/06/1965 | D5595 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 19/06/1965 | D5596 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 19/06/1965 | D5597 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 19/06/1965 | D5599 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 19/06/1965 | D5668 | Transfer in from: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 19/06/1965 | D5678 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 19/06/1965 | D3624 | Transfer out to: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 19/06/1965 | D4088 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 27/06/1965 | 90443 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 02/07/1965 | D1875 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 02/07/1965 | D1882 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 04/07/1965 | 90029 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 06/07/1965 | D1884 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 07/07/1965 | D1879 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 09/07/1965 | D1883 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 09/07/1965 | D1885 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 10/07/1965 | D5852 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 10/07/1965 | 90569 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 10/07/1965 | D5681 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 11/07/1965 | 61089 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 11/07/1965 | 61098 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 11/07/1965 | 61365 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 11/07/1965 | 90294 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 17/07/1965 | D5578 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 17/07/1965 | D5690 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 17/07/1965 | D5595 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 17/07/1965 | D5596 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 17/07/1965 | D5678 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 18/07/1965 | 90660 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 07/08/1965 | D8022 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 07/08/1965 | D8023 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 07/08/1965 | D8024 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 07/08/1965 | D8050 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 07/08/1965 | D8051 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 07/08/1965 | D8052 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 07/08/1965 | D8053 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 13/08/1965 | D1893 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 17/08/1965 | D1887 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 24/08/1965 | D1898 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 26/08/1965 | D1886 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 26/08/1965 | D1899 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 29/08/1965 | 90662 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 02/09/1965 | D1900 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 11/09/1965 | D5679 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 11/09/1965 | D5851 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 11/09/1965 | 90035 | Transfer out to: | 36C | Frodingham | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 11/09/1965 | 90075 | Transfer out to: | 36C | Frodingham | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 18/09/1965 | D8056 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 19/09/1965 | 90242 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 19/09/1965 | 92197 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 22/09/1965 | 61250 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 26/09/1965 | 61003 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 26/09/1965 | 61026 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 26/09/1965 | 61042 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 03/10/1965 | 61058 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 03/10/1965 | 61384 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 03/10/1965 | 61168 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/10/1965 | D8013 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/10/1965 | D8014 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/10/1965 | D8054 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/10/1965 | D8055 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/10/1965 | D8057 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/10/1965 | D1768 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/10/1965 | D1769 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/10/1965 | D1875 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/10/1965 | D1879 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/10/1965 | D1882 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | on | 31/10/1965 | D2303 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 31/10/1965 | 90569 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 06/11/1965 | D1551 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 06/11/1965 | 90364 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 06/11/1965 | 90448 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 06/11/1965 | 90477 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 06/11/1965 | 90506 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 06/11/1965 | 90538 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 06/11/1965 | D5578 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 06/11/1965 | D5599 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 06/11/1965 | D5668 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 06/11/1965 | D5854 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 13/11/1965 | D4059 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 13/11/1965 | D4062 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 13/11/1965 | D4063 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 03/12/1965 | D1894 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | D3/5 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 04/12/1965 | D3152 | Transfer out to: | 16D | Nottingham | ||
Diesel | D3/5 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 04/12/1965 | D3153 | Transfer out to: | 16D | Nottingham | ||
Diesel | D3/5 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 04/12/1965 | D3164 | Transfer out to: | 16D | Nottingham | ||
Diesel | D3/5 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 04/12/1965 | D3165 | Transfer out to: | 16D | Nottingham | ||
Diesel | D3/5 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 04/12/1965 | D3166 | Transfer out to: | 16D | Nottingham | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 05/12/1965 | 90364 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 05/12/1965 | 90448 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 05/12/1965 | 92194 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 11/12/1965 | D4065 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 11/12/1965 | D4068 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/12/1965 | D1894 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/12/1965 | 90142 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 19/12/1965 | 61026 | Transfer in from: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 19/12/1965 | 92202 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 25/12/1965 | D4073 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 25/12/1965 | 92145 | Transfer in from: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 01/01/1966 | D2018 | Transfer in from: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 01/01/1966 | D2019 | Transfer in from: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 01/01/1966 | D2023 | Transfer in from: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 01/01/1966 | D2024 | Transfer in from: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 01/01/1966 | D2025 | Transfer in from: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 01/01/1966 | D2027 | Transfer in from: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 01/01/1966 | D4088 | Transfer in from: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 01/01/1966 | 90037 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 01/01/1966 | 90190 | Transfer in from: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 02/01/1966 | 61223 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 09/01/1966 | 61384 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 16/01/1966 | 90506 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 29/01/1966 | D1797 | Transfer in from: | 41C | Wath | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 29/01/1966 | D1885 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 30/01/1966 | 61250 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Diesel | D3/5 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 05/02/1966 | D3154 | Transfer out to: | 16B | Colwick | ||
Diesel | D3/5 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 05/02/1966 | D3156 | Transfer out to: | 16B | Colwick | ||
Diesel | D3/5 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 05/02/1966 | D3157 | Transfer out to: | 16B | Colwick | ||
Diesel | D3/5 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 05/02/1966 | D3160 | Transfer out to: | 16B | Colwick | ||
Diesel | D3/5 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 05/02/1966 | D3162 | Transfer out to: | 16B | Colwick | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 06/02/1966 | 61406 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 10/02/1966 | 61026 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 10/02/1966 | 61058 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 10/02/1966 | 90190 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | on | 10/02/1966 | 92035 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | on | 10/02/1966 | 92145 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 12/02/1966 | D5533 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 12/02/1966 | D5550 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 12/02/1966 | D5552 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 12/02/1966 | D5565 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 12/02/1966 | D5578 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 12/02/1966 | D5589 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 12/02/1966 | D5698 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 12/02/1966 | D5842 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 12/02/1966 | D5858 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 12/02/1966 | D5860 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/02/1966 | 90037 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/02/1966 | 90477 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/02/1966 | 90538 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 05/03/1966 | D5543 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 05/03/1966 | D5558 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 05/03/1966 | D5561 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 05/03/1966 | D5567 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 05/03/1966 | D5579 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 05/03/1966 | D5586 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 05/03/1966 | D5670 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 05/03/1966 | D5688 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 05/03/1966 | D5691 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 05/03/1966 | D5862 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 19/03/1966 | D1552 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 23/04/1966 | D1801 | Transfer in from: | 41C | Wath | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 23/04/1966 | D1802 | Transfer in from: | 41C | Wath | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 23/04/1966 | D1803 | Transfer in from: | 41C | Wath | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 23/04/1966 | D1804 | Transfer in from: | 41C | Wath | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 23/04/1966 | D1805 | Transfer in from: | 41C | Wath | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 23/04/1966 | D1806 | Transfer in from: | 41C | Wath | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 23/04/1966 | D1885 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 23/04/1966 | D5525 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 23/04/1966 | D5527 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 23/04/1966 | D5534 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 23/04/1966 | D5559 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 23/04/1966 | D5570 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 23/04/1966 | D5571 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 23/04/1966 | D5574 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 23/04/1966 | D5580 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 23/04/1966 | D5582 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 23/04/1966 | D5600 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 23/04/1966 | D5617 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 23/04/1966 | D5618 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 23/04/1966 | D8020 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 23/04/1966 | D8021 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 23/04/1966 | D8025 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 23/04/1966 | D8026 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 23/04/1966 | D8027 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 23/04/1966 | D8045 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 23/04/1966 | D8046 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 23/04/1966 | D8047 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 23/04/1966 | D8048 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 23/04/1966 | D8049 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 07/05/1966 | D5671 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 04/06/1966 | D1800 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 04/06/1966 | D1893 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 11/06/1966 | D5671 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 30/06/1966 | D1576 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 30/06/1966 | D1769 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 30/06/1966 | D1771 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 30/06/1966 | D1782 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 30/06/1966 | D1783 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 30/06/1966 | D1784 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 30/06/1966 | D1785 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 30/06/1966 | D1786 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 30/06/1966 | D1787 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/07/1966 | D2018 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/07/1966 | D2019 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 23/07/1966 | D2299 | Transfer in from: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 30/07/1966 | D2020 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 06/08/1966 | D1554 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 06/08/1966 | D1555 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 06/08/1966 | D1556 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 06/08/1966 | D1557 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 06/08/1966 | D1558 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 06/08/1966 | D1559 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 06/08/1966 | D5599 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 06/08/1966 | D1801 | Transfer out to: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 06/08/1966 | D1802 | Transfer out to: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 06/08/1966 | D1803 | Transfer out to: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 06/08/1966 | D1804 | Transfer out to: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 06/08/1966 | D1805 | Transfer out to: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 06/08/1966 | D1806 | Transfer out to: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 06/08/1966 | D5586 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 06/08/1966 | D5589 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 06/08/1966 | D5592 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 06/08/1966 | D5593 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 06/08/1966 | D5597 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 06/08/1966 | D5600 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 20/08/1966 | D1553 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 20/08/1966 | D5533 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 20/08/1966 | D5842 | Transfer out to: | 41C | Wath | ||
Diesel | D2/5 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 03/09/1966 | D2408 | Transfer in from: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 03/09/1966 | 12137 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 10/09/1966 | D1547 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 10/09/1966 | D1550 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 08/10/1966 | D1531 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 08/10/1966 | D1533 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 08/10/1966 | D1534 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 08/10/1966 | D1535 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 08/10/1966 | D1536 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 08/10/1966 | D1537 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 08/10/1966 | D1538 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 08/10/1966 | D5599 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 08/10/1966 | D5617 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 08/10/1966 | D8013 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 08/10/1966 | D8014 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 08/10/1966 | D8020 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 15/10/1966 | D5533 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 29/10/1966 | D1528 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 29/10/1966 | D1769 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/10/1966 | D4068 | Transfer out to: | 41J | Shirebrook | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 19/11/1966 | D5561 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 26/11/1966 | D1532 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 26/11/1966 | D8242 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 03/12/1966 | D8023 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 03/12/1966 | D8053 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 03/12/1966 | D8054 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 03/12/1966 | D8055 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 07/01/1967 | D5544 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 07/01/1967 | D5548 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 07/01/1967 | D5617 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 07/01/1967 | D8053 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 07/01/1967 | D8054 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 07/01/1967 | D8055 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | D2/7 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 21/01/1967 | D2501 | Transfer out to: | 12C | Barrow in Furness | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 28/01/1967 | D8021 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 28/01/1967 | D8022 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 28/01/1967 | D8024 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 28/01/1967 | D8025 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 28/01/1967 | D8026 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 28/01/1967 | D8027 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Diesel | D3/5 | 0-6-0 | on | 19/02/1967 | D3158 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/03/1967 | D8052 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/03/1967 | D8053 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/03/1967 | D8054 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/03/1967 | D8055 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/03/1967 | D8056 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/03/1967 | D8057 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 18/03/1967 | D1538 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 25/03/1967 | D5671 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 25/03/1967 | D5672 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 25/03/1967 | D5673 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 25/03/1967 | D5674 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 25/03/1967 | D5675 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 25/03/1967 | D5676 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 25/03/1967 | D5533 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 25/03/1967 | D5543 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 25/03/1967 | D5544 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 25/03/1967 | D5579 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 25/03/1967 | D5580 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 15/04/1967 | D5655 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 15/04/1967 | D5656 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 15/04/1967 | D5657 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 15/04/1967 | D5658 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 15/04/1967 | D5578 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/04/1967 | D3477 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | D2/5 | 0-6-0 | on | 07/05/1967 | D2408 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | on | 25/06/1967 | 12123 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/07/1967 | D3618 | Transfer in from: | 41J | Shirebrook | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/08/1967 | D1527 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/08/1967 | D1529 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/08/1967 | D1538 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/08/1967 | D1787 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 12/08/1967 | D8052 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 12/08/1967 | D8053 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 12/08/1967 | D8054 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/08/1967 | D1787 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 12/08/1967 | D5525 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 12/08/1967 | D5527 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 12/08/1967 | D5534 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 12/08/1967 | D5548 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 12/08/1967 | D5559 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 12/08/1967 | D5570 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 12/08/1967 | D5571 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 12/08/1967 | D5574 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 12/08/1967 | D5582 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 12/08/1967 | D5657 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 12/08/1967 | D5658 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/09/1967 | D1762 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/09/1967 | D1763 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/09/1967 | D1862 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/09/1967 | D1863 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/09/1967 | D1864 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/09/1967 | D1869 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/09/1967 | D1870 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/09/1967 | D1871 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/09/1967 | D1558 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/09/1967 | D1559 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/09/1967 | D1885 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/09/1967 | D1886 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/09/1967 | D1887 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/09/1967 | D1898 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/09/1967 | D1899 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/09/1967 | D1900 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/09/1967 | D8045 | Transfer out to: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/09/1967 | D8046 | Transfer out to: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/09/1967 | D8047 | Transfer out to: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/09/1967 | D8048 | Transfer out to: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | D3/5 | 0-6-0 | on | 17/09/1967 | D3155 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | D3/5 | 0-6-0 | on | 17/09/1967 | D3159 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | D3/5 | 0-6-0 | on | 17/09/1967 | D3161 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | D3/5 | 0-6-0 | on | 17/09/1967 | D3163 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 23/09/1967 | D4089 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 23/09/1967 | D4090 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 23/09/1967 | D4093 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 23/09/1967 | D4094 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 07/10/1967 | D8055 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 07/10/1967 | D8056 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 07/10/1967 | D8057 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 25/11/1967 | D1500 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 25/11/1967 | D1501 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 25/11/1967 | D1502 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 25/11/1967 | D1503 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 25/11/1967 | D1504 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 25/11/1967 | D1505 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 25/11/1967 | D1506 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 25/11/1967 | D1507 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 25/11/1967 | D1508 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 25/11/1967 | D1509 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 25/11/1967 | D1527 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 25/11/1967 | D1528 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 25/11/1967 | D1529 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 25/11/1967 | D1531 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 25/11/1967 | D1532 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 25/11/1967 | D1533 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 25/11/1967 | D1534 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 25/11/1967 | D1535 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 25/11/1967 | D1536 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 25/11/1967 | D1537 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 24/02/1968 | D5554 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 24/02/1968 | D5657 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 02/03/1968 | D4056 | Transfer in from: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 02/03/1968 | D2299 | Transfer out to: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/03/1968 | D5573 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/03/1968 | D5619 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 11/05/1968 | D5551 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 11/05/1968 | D5555 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 11/05/1968 | D5556 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 11/05/1968 | D5559 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 11/05/1968 | D5562 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 11/05/1968 | D5570 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 11/05/1968 | D5571 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 11/05/1968 | D5837 | Transfer in from: | 41C | Wath | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 11/05/1968 | D5838 | Transfer in from: | 41C | Wath | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 11/05/1968 | D5839 | Transfer in from: | 41C | Wath | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 06/07/1968 | D3639 | Transfer in from: | 36C | Frodingham | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 06/07/1968 | D3618 | Transfer out to: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 20/07/1968 | D2027 | Transfer out to: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 10/08/1968 | D3427 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 10/08/1968 | D3428 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 10/08/1968 | D3506 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 10/08/1968 | D3508 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 10/08/1968 | D5656 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 10/08/1968 | D5657 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 10/08/1968 | D8055 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 10/08/1968 | D8056 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 10/08/1968 | D8057 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | on | 11/08/1968 | D4088 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | on | 11/08/1968 | D4090 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | on | 11/08/1968 | D4093 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | on | 11/08/1968 | D4094 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 17/08/1968 | D3507 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | on | 18/08/1968 | D4089 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 24/08/1968 | D5602 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/10/1968 | D1882 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/10/1968 | D1885 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 12/10/1968 | D5557 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/10/1968 | D1762 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/10/1968 | D1763 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/10/1968 | D1797 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/11/1968 | D1558 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/11/1968 | D1559 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/11/1968 | D1560 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/11/1968 | D1561 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/11/1968 | D1782 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/11/1968 | D1783 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/11/1968 | D1784 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/11/1968 | D1785 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | on | 19/11/1968 | 12124 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 23/11/1968 | D1836 | Transfer in from: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | on | 25/11/1968 | 12126 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 30/11/1968 | 12117 | Transfer in from: | 53C | Hull Springhead | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 30/11/1968 | 12118 | Transfer in from: | 53C | Hull Springhead | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 28/12/1968 | D1833 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 28/12/1968 | D3312 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 28/12/1968 | D1547 | Transfer out to: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 28/12/1968 | D1548 | Transfer out to: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 28/12/1968 | D5602 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 25/01/1969 | D5583 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 25/01/1969 | D5660 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/02/1969 | 12133 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | on | 28/02/1969 | 12117 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/03/1969 | D3520 | Transfer in from: | 87B | Margam | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 29/03/1969 | D5685 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 29/03/1969 | D5655 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 05/04/1969 | D3195 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 12/04/1969 | D3549 | Transfer in from: | 36C | Frodingham | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 03/05/1969 | D3639 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 17/05/1969 | D5577 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 17/05/1969 | D5689 | Transfer in from: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 17/05/1969 | D5801 | Transfer in from: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 17/05/1969 | D5802 | Transfer in from: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 17/05/1969 | D5803 | Transfer in from: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 17/05/1969 | D5828 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 17/05/1969 | D5855 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 17/05/1969 | D5856 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 17/05/1969 | D5859 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 17/05/1969 | D8058 | Transfer in from: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 17/05/1969 | D1871 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 17/05/1969 | D2021 | Transfer out to: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 17/05/1969 | D2022 | Transfer out to: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 17/05/1969 | D2023 | Transfer out to: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 17/05/1969 | D4065 | Transfer out to: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 24/05/1969 | D6938 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 31/05/1969 | D2024 | Transfer out to: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 07/06/1969 | D5547 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 07/06/1969 | D5655 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 14/06/1969 | D1565 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 14/06/1969 | D4079 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 5w/e | 14/06/1969 | D6938 | Transfer out to: | 91E | To Eastern Region | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 28/06/1969 | D1529 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | on | 28/06/1969 | 12125 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | on | 28/06/1969 | 12135 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 05/07/1969 | D5568 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 05/07/1969 | D5586 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 19/07/1969 | D2026 | Transfer out to: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 26/07/1969 | D1537 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 26/07/1969 | D4053 | Transfer in from: | 41J | Shirebrook | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 16/08/1969 | D1871 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 16/08/1969 | D1504 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 23/08/1969 | D1868 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 23/08/1969 | D1873 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 23/08/1969 | D1503 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 23/08/1969 | D1507 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 13/09/1969 | D4070 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 13/09/1969 | D2025 | Transfer out to: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 27/09/1969 | D1866 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 27/09/1969 | D1874 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 27/09/1969 | D1501 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 27/09/1969 | D1505 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 04/10/1969 | D1865 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 04/10/1969 | D1506 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/10/1969 | D1536 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/10/1969 | D1539 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/10/1969 | D1564 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/10/1969 | D1573 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/10/1969 | D1577 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/10/1969 | D1578 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/10/1969 | D1580 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/10/1969 | D1581 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/10/1969 | D1867 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/10/1969 | D1508 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/10/1969 | D1862 | Transfer out to: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/10/1969 | D1863 | Transfer out to: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/10/1969 | D1864 | Transfer out to: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/10/1969 | D1865 | Transfer out to: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/10/1969 | D1883 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/10/1969 | D1884 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 18/10/1969 | D3320 | Transfer in from: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 01/11/1969 | D1775 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 01/11/1969 | D1872 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 01/11/1969 | D1502 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 01/11/1969 | D1509 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1969 | 12122 | Transfer in from: | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1969 | D4062 | Transfer out to: | 36C | Frodingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 06/12/1969 | D1864 | Transfer in from: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 06/12/1969 | D1865 | Transfer in from: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 06/12/1969 | D1833 | Transfer out to: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 06/12/1969 | D1836 | Transfer out to: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 27/12/1969 | D4056 | Transfer out to: | 41J | Shirebrook | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 27/12/1969 | D4070 | Transfer out to: | 41J | Shirebrook | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 10/01/1970 | D1862 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 10/01/1970 | D1863 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 10/01/1970 | D5548 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 10/01/1970 | D5549 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 10/01/1970 | D5622 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 10/01/1970 | D5677 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 10/01/1970 | D1573 | Transfer out to: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 10/01/1970 | D5586 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 31/01/1970 | D1888 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 31/01/1970 | D1889 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 31/01/1970 | D1896 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 31/01/1970 | D1872 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 31/01/1970 | D1873 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 31/01/1970 | D1874 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 07/03/1970 | D5813 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 07/03/1970 | D5815 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 07/03/1970 | D5817 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 07/03/1970 | D5825 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 07/03/1970 | D5829 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 07/03/1970 | D5834 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 07/03/1970 | D5801 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 07/03/1970 | D5828 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 07/03/1970 | D5837 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 07/03/1970 | D5838 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 07/03/1970 | D5839 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 07/03/1970 | D5862 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 28/03/1970 | D1875 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 28/03/1970 | D1876 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 28/03/1970 | D1877 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 28/03/1970 | D1878 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 18/04/1970 | D1886 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 02/05/1970 | D1769 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/05/1970 | D5617 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/05/1970 | D5622 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/05/1970 | D5677 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 06/06/1970 | D5617 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 06/06/1970 | D5618 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 11/07/1970 | D1106 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 11/07/1970 | D1107 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 11/07/1970 | D1534 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 11/07/1970 | D1535 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 11/07/1970 | D1767 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 11/07/1970 | D1773 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 11/07/1970 | D1782 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 11/07/1970 | D1783 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 11/07/1970 | D1791 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 11/07/1970 | D1897 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 11/07/1970 | D1898 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 11/07/1970 | D1899 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | 4w/e | 11/07/1970 | D5550 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 4w/e | 11/07/1970 | D5551 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | 4w/e | 11/07/1970 | D5552 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | 4w/e | 11/07/1970 | D5554 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 4w/e | 11/07/1970 | D5555 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 4w/e | 11/07/1970 | D5556 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | 4w/e | 11/07/1970 | D5558 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 4w/e | 11/07/1970 | D5559 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 4w/e | 11/07/1970 | D5562 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | 4w/e | 11/07/1970 | D5565 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | 4w/e | 11/07/1970 | D5567 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 10/10/1970 | D1768 | Transfer in from: | 55B | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 10/10/1970 | D8027 | Transfer in from: | 55B | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 10/10/1970 | D8028 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 10/10/1970 | D8029 | Transfer in from: | 55B | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 10/10/1970 | D8031 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 10/10/1970 | D1106 | Transfer out to: | 55B | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 10/10/1970 | D1107 | Transfer out to: | 55B | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 10/10/1970 | D3195 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 24/10/1970 | D4063 | Transfer out to: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 07/11/1970 | D1545 | Transfer in from: | 55B | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 07/11/1970 | D1548 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 07/11/1970 | D1702 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 07/11/1970 | D1783 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 07/11/1970 | D5685 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 26/12/1970 | 12121 | Transfer in from: | 50C | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/01/1971 | D5550 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/01/1971 | D5551 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 23/01/1971 | D1500 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 23/01/1971 | D1782 | Transfer out to: | 55G | Knottingley | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 13/02/1971 | D3320 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 27/02/1971 | D1878 | Transfer out to: | 55G | Knottingley | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 27/03/1971 | D5553 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 27/03/1971 | D5547 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | on | 27/03/1971 | D8242 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 03/04/1971 | D5583 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | on | 25/04/1971 | 12118 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 01/05/1971 | D3554 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 08/05/1971 | D5546 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 08/05/1971 | D5552 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 08/05/1971 | D5554 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 08/05/1971 | D5555 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 08/05/1971 | D5556 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 08/05/1971 | D1548 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 08/05/1971 | D1549 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 08/05/1971 | D1551 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 08/05/1971 | D1552 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 08/05/1971 | D1553 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 08/05/1971 | D8058 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 29/05/1971 | D1770 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 29/05/1971 | D1771 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 29/05/1971 | D1872 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 29/05/1971 | D1873 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 29/05/1971 | D1874 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 29/05/1971 | D1550 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 29/05/1971 | D1561 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 29/05/1971 | D1576 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 29/05/1971 | D1580 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 29/05/1971 | D1702 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 29/05/1971 | D1771 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 29/05/1971 | D5548 | Transfer out to: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | on | 04/07/1971 | 12121 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | on | 04/07/1971 | 12122 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 10/07/1971 | D12 | Transfer in from: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 10/07/1971 | D1551 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 10/07/1971 | D1552 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 10/07/1971 | D1553 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 10/07/1971 | D4066 | Transfer in from: | 41J | Shirebrook | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 10/07/1971 | D1535 | Transfer out to: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 10/07/1971 | D1770 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 10/07/1971 | D1771 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 10/07/1971 | D1773 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 07/08/1971 | D5550 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 14/08/1971 | D5825 | Transfer out to: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 11/09/1971 | D5825 | Transfer in from: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 11/09/1971 | D5817 | Transfer out to: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 18/09/1971 | D5549 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 18/09/1971 | D5802 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D1546 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D1566 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D1567 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D1568 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D1706 | Transfer in from: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D5562 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D5565 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D5567 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D5598 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D5686 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D5692 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D5693 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D5694 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D5695 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D5847 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D5849 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D12 | Transfer out to: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D1551 | Transfer out to: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D1552 | Transfer out to: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D1553 | Transfer out to: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D1554 | Transfer out to: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D1555 | Transfer out to: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D5825 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D5858 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D8027 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 04/12/1971 | D5692 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 04/12/1971 | D5695 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | on | 12/12/1971 | D4059 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | on | 31/12/1971 | D4053 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 08/01/1972 | D4062 | Transfer in from: | 36C | Frodingham | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 08/01/1972 | D5533 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 08/01/1972 | D5537 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 08/01/1972 | D1791 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 08/01/1972 | D5554 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 08/01/1972 | D5655 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 08/01/1972 | D5688 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 08/01/1972 | D5803 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | on | 11/01/1972 | D4062 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 15/01/1972 | D3080 | Transfer in from: | 36C | Frodingham | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/01/1972 | D4056 | Transfer in from: | 41J | Shirebrook | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 19/02/1972 | D3507 | Transfer out to: | 36C | Frodingham | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 04/03/1972 | D5603 | Transfer in from: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 04/03/1972 | D5691 | Transfer out to: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 15/04/1972 | D1551 | Transfer in from: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 15/04/1972 | D1539 | Transfer out to: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 06/05/1972 | D3081 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 06/05/1972 | D3551 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 06/05/1972 | D5534 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 06/05/1972 | D1767 | Transfer out to: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 06/05/1972 | D1768 | Transfer out to: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 06/05/1972 | D1775 | Transfer out to: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 06/05/1972 | D5856 | Transfer out to: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 03/06/1972 | D1524 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 03/06/1972 | D1577 | Transfer out to: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 10/06/1972 | D1768 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 10/06/1972 | D1578 | Transfer out to: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | on | 11/06/1972 | D4056 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 24/06/1972 | D1625 | Transfer in from: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 24/06/1972 | D1628 | Transfer in from: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 24/06/1972 | D1629 | Transfer in from: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 24/06/1972 | D1767 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 24/06/1972 | D1524 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 24/06/1972 | D1529 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 24/06/1972 | D1537 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 24/06/1972 | D1581 | Transfer out to: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | on | 25/06/1972 | D4066 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | on | 25/06/1972 | D4073 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | on | 25/06/1972 | D4079 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 01/07/1972 | D3004 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 01/07/1972 | D3006 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 08/07/1972 | D5594 | Transfer in from: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 08/07/1972 | D5597 | Transfer in from: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 08/07/1972 | D5654 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 08/07/1972 | D5696 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 08/07/1972 | D1882 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 08/07/1972 | D5617 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 08/07/1972 | D5686 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 08/07/1972 | D5689 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 08/07/1972 | D5690 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 12/08/1972 | D5523 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 12/08/1972 | D5524 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 12/08/1972 | D5527 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 12/08/1972 | D5531 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 12/08/1972 | D5545 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 12/08/1972 | D5549 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 12/08/1972 | D5563 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 12/08/1972 | D5574 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 12/08/1972 | D5581 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 12/08/1972 | D5620 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/08/1972 | D6737 | Transfer in from: | 55C | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/08/1972 | D6871 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/08/1972 | D6872 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/08/1972 | D6899 | Transfer in from: | 55C | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/08/1972 | D6901 | Transfer in from: | 55C | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/08/1972 | D6902 | Transfer in from: | 55C | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/08/1972 | D6911 | Transfer in from: | 55C | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 12/08/1972 | D5533 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 12/08/1972 | D5546 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 12/08/1972 | D5551 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 12/08/1972 | D5552 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 12/08/1972 | D5553 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 12/08/1972 | D5568 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 12/08/1972 | D5577 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 26/08/1972 | D3911 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 26/08/1972 | D3919 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 02/09/1972 | D1770 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 02/09/1972 | D1536 | Transfer out to: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 07/10/1972 | D1778 | Transfer in from: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 07/10/1972 | D1880 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 07/10/1972 | D1881 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 07/10/1972 | D1882 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 07/10/1972 | D1883 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 07/10/1972 | D1884 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 07/10/1972 | D1887 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 07/10/1972 | D5854 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 07/10/1972 | D6874 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 07/10/1972 | D1545 | Transfer out to: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 07/10/1972 | D5555 | Transfer out to: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 07/10/1972 | D5556 | Transfer out to: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 07/10/1972 | D5847 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 07/10/1972 | D5849 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 07/10/1972 | D5860 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 07/10/1972 | D6737 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 28/10/1972 | D1706 | Transfer out to: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 28/10/1972 | D5581 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 04/11/1972 | D1771 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 04/11/1972 | D359 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 04/11/1972 | D1534 | Transfer out to: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 11/11/1972 | D5586 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 11/11/1972 | D5659 | Transfer in from: | 55B | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 11/11/1972 | D5537 | Transfer out to: | 55B | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 26/11/1972 | D3006 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/12/1972 | D1622 | Transfer in from: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/12/1972 | D1558 | Transfer out to: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 06/01/1973 | D1635 | Transfer in from: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 27/01/1973 | D1963 | Transfer in from: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 27/01/1973 | D1566 | Transfer out to: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 24/02/1973 | D1727 | Transfer in from: | D02 | Birmingham Division | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 24/02/1973 | D1551 | Transfer out to: | D02 | Birmingham Division | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 10/03/1973 | D1626 | Transfer in from: | D02 | Birmingham Division | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 10/03/1973 | D6865 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 10/03/1973 | D6866 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 10/03/1973 | D1556 | Transfer out to: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 2w/e | 10/03/1973 | D5594 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 2w/e | 10/03/1973 | D5597 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 2w/e | 10/03/1973 | D5598 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 2w/e | 10/03/1973 | D5603 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 2w/e | 10/03/1973 | D5654 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 24/03/1973 | D1733 | Transfer in from: | D02 | Birmingham Division | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 24/03/1973 | D1565 | Transfer out to: | D02 | Birmingham Division | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 07/04/1973 | D1557 | Transfer out to: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 14/04/1973 | D1749 | Transfer in from: | D02 | Birmingham Division | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 21/04/1973 | D1559 | Transfer out to: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 28/04/1973 | D1693 | Transfer in from: | D02 | Birmingham Division | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/05/1973 | D1691 | Transfer in from: | D02 | Birmingham Division | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 12/05/1973 | D8091 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 12/05/1973 | D8092 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 12/05/1973 | D8127 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/05/1973 | D1567 | Transfer out to: | CE | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/05/1973 | D1875 | Transfer out to: | CE | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/05/1973 | D1876 | Transfer out to: | CE | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/05/1973 | D1877 | Transfer out to: | CE | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/05/1973 | D1883 | Transfer out to: | CE | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/05/1973 | D1884 | Transfer out to: | CE | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/05/1973 | D1886 | Transfer out to: | CE | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 12/05/1973 | D359 | Transfer out to: | HA | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 19/05/1973 | D1631 | Transfer in from: | CE | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 19/05/1973 | D8026 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 19/05/1973 | D1749 | Transfer out to: | SX | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 19/05/1973 | D5859 | Transfer out to: | SX | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 02/06/1973 | D1736 | Transfer in from: | D02 | Birmingham Division | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 02/06/1973 | D1560 | Transfer out to: | BS | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 02/06/1973 | D1787 | Transfer out to: | CE | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 02/06/1973 | D8026 | Transfer out to: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 02/06/1973 | D8049 | Transfer out to: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 02/06/1973 | D8091 | Transfer out to: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 02/06/1973 | D8092 | Transfer out to: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 02/06/1973 | D8127 | Transfer out to: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/06/1973 | D1754 | Transfer in from: | D02 | Birmingham Division | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/06/1973 | D1569 | Transfer out to: | BS | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 07/07/1973 | D6864 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 07/07/1973 | D1538 | Transfer out to: | SX | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 07/07/1973 | D1564 | Transfer out to: | BS | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 07/07/1973 | D1786 | Transfer out to: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 2w/e | 07/07/1973 | D5834 | Transfer out to: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 28/07/1973 | D1695 | Transfer in from: | D02 | Birmingham Division | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 28/07/1973 | D1568 | Transfer out to: | BS | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/08/1973 | D1761 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/08/1973 | D1762 | Transfer in from: | FP | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/08/1973 | D1763 | Transfer in from: | FP | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/08/1973 | D1764 | Transfer in from: | FP | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/08/1973 | D1769 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/08/1973 | D1769 | Transfer out to: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | D6718 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | D6720 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | D6737 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | D6781 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | D6786 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | D6789 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | D6791 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | D6796 | Transfer in from: | 55C | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | D6797 | Transfer in from: | 55C | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | D6798 | Transfer in from: | 55C | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | D6803 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | D6805 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | D6815 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | D6816 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | D1622 | Transfer out to: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | D1626 | Transfer out to: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | D1628 | Transfer out to: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | D1629 | Transfer out to: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | D1631 | Transfer out to: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | D1635 | Transfer out to: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | D1778 | Transfer out to: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | D1880 | Transfer out to: | TE | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | D1881 | Transfer out to: | TE | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | D1882 | Transfer out to: | TE | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | D1885 | Transfer out to: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | D1887 | Transfer out to: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | D1896 | Transfer out to: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | D1897 | Transfer out to: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | D1899 | Transfer out to: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | D1963 | Transfer out to: | GD | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | 47044 | Transfer out to: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | D5619 | Transfer out to: | FP | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | D8050 | Transfer out to: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 10/11/1973 | 31323 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 10/11/1973 | D5862 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 10/11/1973 | D6815 | Transfer out to: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 10/11/1973 | D6816 | Transfer out to: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/01/1974 | D1717 | Transfer in from: | SF | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/01/1974 | 47125 | Transfer in from: | SF | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/01/1974 | 47127 | Transfer in from: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 12/01/1974 | D5538 | Transfer in from: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 12/01/1974 | D5665 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 12/01/1974 | D5805 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 12/01/1974 | 31266 | Transfer out to: | MR | March | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 12/01/1974 | D5565 | Transfer out to: | YK | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 12/01/1974 | D5660 | Transfer out to: | MR | March | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 12/01/1974 | D5829 | Transfer out to: | TE | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 23/02/1974 | D5694 | Transfer out to: | TO | Toton | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/03/1974 | 31134 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/03/1974 | 31167 | Transfer in from: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/03/1974 | 31264 | Transfer in from: | TO | Toton | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/03/1974 | 37021 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/03/1974 | 37048 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/03/1974 | 37095 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/03/1974 | 37118 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/03/1974 | 47177 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/03/1974 | 47183 | Transfer in from: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/03/1974 | 47263 | Transfer in from: | GD | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/03/1974 | 47265 | Transfer in from: | GD | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/03/1974 | D5601 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/03/1974 | 31248 | Transfer out to: | FP | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/03/1974 | 37164 | Transfer out to: | TE | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/03/1974 | 37165 | Transfer out to: | TE | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/03/1974 | 47125 | Transfer out to: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 16/03/1974 | 37037 | Transfer out to: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 16/03/1974 | 37081 | Transfer out to: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 16/03/1974 | 37086 | Transfer out to: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 16/03/1974 | 37089 | Transfer out to: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 16/03/1974 | 37091 | Transfer out to: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 16/03/1974 | 37095 | Transfer out to: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 16/03/1974 | 37103 | Transfer out to: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 16/03/1974 | 37105 | Transfer out to: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 20/04/1974 | 47209 | Transfer in from: | CD | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 20/04/1974 | 47127 | Transfer out to: | CD | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 20026 | Transfer in from: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 37055 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 37094 | Transfer in from: | 55C | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 47036 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 47037 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 47038 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 47041 | Transfer in from: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 47042 | Transfer in from: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 47043 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 47100 | Transfer in from: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 47102 | Transfer in from: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 31152 | Transfer out to: | TE | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 31282 | Transfer out to: | TE | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 31283 | Transfer out to: | TE | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 37118 | Transfer out to: | MR | March | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 47141 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 47143 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 47166 | Transfer out to: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 47167 | Transfer out to: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 47168 | Transfer out to: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 47169 | Transfer out to: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 47173 | Transfer out to: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 47174 | Transfer out to: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 47319 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 47369 | Transfer out to: | CD | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 15/06/1974 | D1964 | Transfer in from: | CD | Cricklewood East | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 15/06/1974 | 47126 | Transfer out to: | CD | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 06/07/1974 | 47306 | Transfer in from: | CE | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 06/07/1974 | 31153 | Transfer out to: | TE | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 06/07/1974 | 47264 | Transfer out to: | CD | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 10/08/1974 | 37137 | Transfer in from: | LE | Landore | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 10/08/1974 | 37141 | Transfer in from: | LE | Landore | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 10/08/1974 | 37221 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 10/08/1974 | 37048 | Transfer out to: | GD | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 10/08/1974 | 37097 | Transfer out to: | TE | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 10/08/1974 | 37098 | Transfer out to: | HM | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | 20007 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | 20010 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | 20017 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | 20019 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | 20030 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | 37019 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | 37252 | Transfer in from: | 55C | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | 47044 | Transfer in from: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | 47045 | Transfer in from: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | 47046 | Transfer in from: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | 31134 | Transfer out to: | YK | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | 31139 | Transfer out to: | TE | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | 31263 | Transfer out to: | MR | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | 31318 | Transfer out to: | MR | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | 31319 | Transfer out to: | YK | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | 31321 | Transfer out to: | MR | March | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | 37021 | Transfer out to: | HM | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | 37094 | Transfer out to: | TE | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | 37096 | Transfer out to: | HM | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | 47100 | Transfer out to: | SF | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | 47102 | Transfer out to: | SF | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/10/1974 | 47214 | Transfer out to: | CD | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 19/10/1974 | 20017 | Transfer out to: | HA | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 19/10/1974 | 20019 | Transfer out to: | HA | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 19/10/1974 | 20030 | Transfer out to: | HA | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 09/11/1974 | 08391 | Transfer out to: | FH | Frodingham | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 2w/e | 30/11/1974 | 31134 | Transfer in from: | FP | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 2w/e | 30/11/1974 | 31264 | Transfer out to: | FP | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 2w/e | 11/01/1975 | 31280 | Transfer in from: | YK | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 2w/e | 11/01/1975 | 31281 | Transfer in from: | YK | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 2w/e | 11/01/1975 | 31284 | Transfer in from: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 11/01/1975 | 37057 | Transfer in from: | TE | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 11/01/1975 | 37059 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | 2w/e | 11/01/1975 | 20054 | Transfer out to: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 11/01/1975 | 47016 | Transfer out to: | SF | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 11/01/1975 | 47135 | Transfer out to: | SF | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 11/01/1975 | 47160 | Transfer out to: | SF | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 01/02/1975 | 47107 | Transfer out to: | BS | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 08/03/1975 | 37060 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 08/03/1975 | 47180 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 08/03/1975 | 47181 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 08/03/1975 | 20007 | Transfer out to: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 08/03/1975 | 20010 | Transfer out to: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 08/03/1975 | 31116 | Transfer out to: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 3w/e | 10/05/1975 | 31124 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 3w/e | 10/05/1975 | 31132 | Transfer in from: | TE | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 3w/e | 10/05/1975 | 47039 | Transfer in from: | TE | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 3w/e | 10/05/1975 | 37055 | Transfer out to: | MR | March | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 3w/e | 10/05/1975 | 37057 | Transfer out to: | MR | March | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 3w/e | 10/05/1975 | 37059 | Transfer out to: | MR | March | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 3w/e | 10/05/1975 | 37166 | Transfer out to: | TE | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 3w/e | 10/05/1975 | 37199 | Transfer out to: | TE | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 3w/e | 10/05/1975 | 47103 | Transfer out to: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 3w/e | 10/05/1975 | 47105 | Transfer out to: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 3w/e | 10/05/1975 | 47172 | Transfer out to: | SF | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 07/06/1975 | 47306 | Transfer out to: | TO | Toton | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | 3w/e | 12/07/1975 | 31244 | Transfer out to: | MR | March | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 3w/e | 12/07/1975 | 31275 | Transfer out to: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 3w/e | 12/07/1975 | 37137 | Transfer out to: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 3w/e | 12/07/1975 | 37141 | Transfer out to: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 3w/e | 12/07/1975 | 47175 | Transfer out to: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 3w/e | 12/07/1975 | 47176 | Transfer out to: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 11/10/1975 | 08537 | Transfer in from: | 41J | Langwith Junction | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 2w/e | 11/10/1975 | 31148 | Transfer in from: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 11/10/1975 | 31262 | Transfer in from: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 11/10/1975 | 47307 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 11/10/1975 | 47311 | Transfer in from: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 11/10/1975 | 47312 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 2w/e | 11/10/1975 | 31196 | Transfer out to: | SF | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 18/10/1975 | 08001 | Transfer out to: | GD | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/11/1975 | 47303 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/11/1975 | 47307 | Transfer out to: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 3w/e | 04/01/1976 | 47601 | Transfer out to: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 2w/e | 25/01/1976 | 31196 | Transfer in from: | SF | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 29/02/1976 | 31120 | Transfer out to: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 29/02/1976 | 31124 | Transfer out to: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 29/02/1976 | 31132 | Transfer out to: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 29/02/1976 | 31134 | Transfer out to: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 29/02/1976 | 31167 | Transfer out to: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 29/02/1976 | 31262 | Transfer out to: | MR | March | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 3w/e | 02/05/1976 | 31120 | Transfer in from: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 3w/e | 02/05/1976 | 31124 | Transfer in from: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 3w/e | 02/05/1976 | 31132 | Transfer in from: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 3w/e | 02/05/1976 | 31134 | Transfer in from: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 3w/e | 02/05/1976 | 31159 | Transfer in from: | FP | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 3w/e | 02/05/1976 | 31288 | Transfer in from: | GD | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 3w/e | 02/05/1976 | 47047 | Transfer in from: | HO | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 3w/e | 02/05/1976 | 31168 | Transfer out to: | FP | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 02/05/1976 | 47045 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 3w/e | 02/05/1976 | 47177 | Transfer out to: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 3w/e | 02/05/1976 | 47180 | Transfer out to: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 3w/e | 02/05/1976 | 47181 | Transfer out to: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 16/05/1976 | 47170 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 16/05/1976 | 31105 | Transfer out to: | SF | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 16/05/1976 | 31106 | Transfer out to: | SF | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 16/05/1976 | 31268 | Transfer out to: | HO | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 23/05/1976 | 31211 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 23/05/1976 | 31233 | Transfer in from: | MR | March | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 23/05/1976 | 31109 | Transfer out to: | MR | March | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | m/e | 10/1976 | 31115 | Transfer in from: | YK | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | m/e | 10/1976 | 31194 | Transfer in from: | FP | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | m/e | 10/1976 | 31127 | Transfer out to: | YK | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | m/e | 10/1976 | 31131 | Transfer out to: | YK | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 3w/e | 09/10/1976 | 31124 | Transfer out to: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 3w/e | 09/10/1976 | 31132 | Transfer out to: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | m/e | 01/1977 | 31109 | Transfer in from: | MR | March | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | m/e | 01/1977 | 31113 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | m/e | 01/1977 | 31171 | Transfer in from: | FP | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | m/e | 01/1977 | 31181 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 01/1977 | 47295 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | m/e | 01/1977 | 31113 | Transfer out to: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | m/e | 01/1977 | 20084 | Transfer in from: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | m/e | 01/1977 | 20159 | Transfer in from: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 02/1977 | 47380 | Transfer in from: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | m/e | 02/1977 | 20084 | Transfer out to: | TO | Toton | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | m/e | 02/1977 | 20159 | Transfer out to: | TO | Toton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 02/1977 | 47295 | Transfer out to: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | m/e | 05/1977 | 37024 | Transfer in from: | TE | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | m/e | 05/1977 | 37283 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 05/1977 | 47180 | Transfer in from: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 05/1977 | 47181 | Transfer in from: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | m/e | 05/1977 | 31145 | Transfer out to: | SF | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | m/e | 05/1977 | 31148 | Transfer out to: | SF | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | m/e | 05/1977 | 31156 | Transfer out to: | SF | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | m/e | 05/1977 | 31159 | Transfer out to: | HO | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | m/e | 05/1977 | 31180 | Transfer out to: | HO | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 05/1977 | 47036 | Transfer out to: | HA | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 05/1977 | 47037 | Transfer out to: | HA | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 05/1977 | 47038 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | m/e | 07/1977 | 37160 | Transfer in from: | TE | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 09/1977 | 08504 | Reinstated | 98S | |||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 09/1977 | 08061 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 09/1977 | 08076 | Transfer in from: | DR | Doncaster | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 04/09/1977 | 08065 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 04/09/1977 | 08066 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 04/09/1977 | 08357 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | m/e | 10/1977 | 20025 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | m/e | 10/1977 | 37170 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 10/1977 | 47158 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 10/1977 | 47162 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 10/1977 | 47165 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 10/1977 | 47167 | Transfer in from: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 10/1977 | 47168 | Transfer in from: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 10/1977 | 47172 | Transfer in from: | SF | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | m/e | 10/1977 | 31109 | Transfer out to: | SF | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 06/10/1977 | 08358 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 27/11/1977 | 37140 | Transfer in from: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 27/11/1977 | 37143 | Transfer in from: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 27/11/1977 | 37168 | Transfer in from: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 27/11/1977 | 47160 | Transfer in from: | SF | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 4w/e | 27/11/1977 | 31181 | Transfer out to: | YK | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 4w/e | 27/11/1977 | 31327 | Transfer out to: | YK | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 27/11/1977 | 47167 | Transfer out to: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 27/11/1977 | 47168 | Transfer out to: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 27/11/1977 | 47180 | Transfer out to: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 27/11/1977 | 47181 | Transfer out to: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 27/11/1977 | 47183 | Transfer out to: | YK | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 31/12/1977 | 08508 | Transfer in from: | 36C | Frodingham | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 29/01/1978 | 20023 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 29/01/1978 | 37055 | Transfer in from: | GD | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 29/01/1978 | 47160 | Transfer out to: | SF | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | m/e | 02/1978 | 31161 | Transfer in from: | FP | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | m/e | 02/1978 | 31183 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | m/e | 02/1978 | 31214 | Transfer in from: | FP | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | m/e | 02/1978 | 31215 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | m/e | 02/1978 | 20023 | Transfer out to: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | m/e | 02/1978 | 37019 | Transfer out to: | TE | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | m/e | 11/1978 | 31147 | Transfer in from: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | m/e | 11/1978 | 31248 | Transfer in from: | TE | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | m/e | 11/1978 | 31266 | Transfer in from: | TE | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | m/e | 11/1978 | 31311 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 2w/e | 10/03/1979 | 31156 | Transfer in from: | SF | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 2w/e | 10/03/1979 | 31317 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 30/11/1979 | 47291 | Transfer in from: | TE | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 30/11/1979 | 47307 | Transfer in from: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 30/11/1979 | 08393 | Transfer out to: | MR | March | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | m/e | 30/11/1979 | 31171 | Transfer out to: | HM | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | m/e | 30/11/1979 | 31245 | Transfer out to: | HM | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | m/e | 30/11/1979 | 31281 | Transfer out to: | HM | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 21/09/1980 | 08076 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 31/05/1981 | 47162 | Transfer out to: | SF | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 21/06/1981 | 37050 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 21/06/1981 | 47041 | Transfer out to: | SF | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 21/06/1981 | 47209 | Transfer out to: | HA | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 05/07/1981 | 37153 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 26/07/1981 | 20003 | Transfer in from: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 26/07/1981 | 20019 | Transfer in from: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 26/07/1981 | 31130 | Transfer in from: | TE | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 26/07/1981 | 31155 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 26/07/1981 | 31234 | Transfer in from: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 26/07/1981 | 31240 | Transfer in from: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | on | 26/07/1981 | 31155 | Transfer out to: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 26/07/1981 | 47212 | Transfer out to: | TE | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 26/07/1981 | 47221 | Transfer out to: | TE | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 16/08/1981 | 20003 | To Store | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 06/09/1981 | 47042 | Transfer out to: | HA | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 04/10/1981 | 20029 | To Store | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1981 | 47216 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1981 | 47302 | Transfer in from: | 55G | Knottingley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1981 | 47213 | Transfer out to: | GD | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1981 | 47215 | Transfer out to: | GD | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1981 | 47216 | Transfer out to: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1981 | 47217 | Transfer out to: | GD | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 18/10/1981 | 31149 | Transfer out to: | TO | Toton | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 01/11/1981 | 31120 | Transfer in from: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 01/11/1981 | 37141 | Transfer in from: | SF | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 01/11/1981 | 37166 | Transfer in from: | SF | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 01/11/1981 | 47304 | Transfer in from: | SF | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 01/11/1981 | 31120 | Transfer out to: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 01/11/1981 | 31266 | Transfer out to: | SF | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 01/11/1981 | 37050 | Transfer out to: | SF | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 01/11/1981 | 37140 | Transfer out to: | MR | March | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 22/11/1981 | 08386 | Transfer in from: | BG | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 15/05/1983 | 31214 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 06/05/1984 | 08061 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 14/12/1986 | 08242 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 06/01/1987 | 08386 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 04/10/1987 | 31118 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 04/10/1987 | 31123 | Transfer in from: | OC | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 04/10/1987 | 31319 | Transfer in from: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 04/10/1987 | 31403 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 04/10/1987 | 31417 | Transfer in from: | HO | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 04/10/1987 | 31421 | Transfer in from: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 37127 | Transfer in from: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 37241 | Transfer in from: | 87A | Landore | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 37252 | Transfer in from: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 47276 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 47277 | Transfer in from: | 55G | Knottingley | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 04/10/1987 | 31120 | Transfer out to: | TE | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 04/10/1987 | 31156 | Transfer out to: | SF | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 04/10/1987 | 31288 | Transfer out to: | SF | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 04/10/1987 | 31311 | Transfer out to: | SF | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 04/10/1987 | 31323 | Transfer out to: | SF | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 37160 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 37170 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 37174 | Transfer out to: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 37252 | Transfer out to: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 47220 | Transfer out to: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 47565 | Transfer out to: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 47567 | Transfer out to: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 47569 | Transfer out to: | IS | Inverness | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 47582 | Transfer out to: | OC | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 47583 | Transfer out to: | OC | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 47587 | Transfer out to: | IS | Inverness | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 15/05/1988 | 20146 | Transfer in from: | TO | Toton | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 15/05/1988 | 20201 | Transfer in from: | HA | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 15/05/1988 | 20202 | Transfer in from: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 15/05/1988 | 20203 | Transfer in from: | HA | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 15/05/1988 | 20204 | Transfer in from: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 15/05/1988 | 20225 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 15/05/1988 | 20226 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 37050 | Transfer in from: | SF | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 37094 | Transfer in from: | HM | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 37320 | Transfer in from: | MR | March | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 47329 | Transfer in from: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 47331 | Transfer in from: | TO | Toton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 47332 | Transfer in from: | BS | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 47344 | Transfer in from: | CD | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 47348 | Transfer in from: | CD | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 47352 | Transfer in from: | CD | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 47401 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 47402 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 47406 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 47407 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 47411 | Transfer in from: | GD | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 47413 | Transfer in from: | GD | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 47417 | Transfer in from: | GD | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 47418 | Transfer in from: | GD | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 15/05/1988 | 31134 | Transfer out to: | SF | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 15/05/1988 | 31215 | Transfer out to: | TE | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 15/05/1988 | 31248 | Transfer out to: | BS | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 15/05/1988 | 31400 | Transfer out to: | CD | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 15/05/1988 | 31421 | Transfer out to: | CD | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 15/05/1988 | 31466 | Transfer out to: | CD | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 37024 | Transfer out to: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 37127 | Transfer out to: | ML | Motherwell | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 47566 | Transfer out to: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 47591 | Transfer out to: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 22/05/1988 | 20171 | Transfer in from: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 22/05/1988 | 20185 | Transfer in from: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 22/05/1988 | 20228 | Transfer in from: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 22/05/1988 | 31183 | Transfer in from: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 22/05/1988 | 31304 | Transfer in from: | SF | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 22/05/1988 | 31183 | Transfer out to: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 23/05/1988 | 31183 | Transfer out to: | 98Su | |||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 12/06/1988 | 20204 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 28/08/1988 | 31231 | Transfer in from: | CD | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 02/09/1988 | 20201 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 04/09/1988 | 37211 | Transfer out to: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 26/09/1988 | 20226 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 17/10/1988 | 08439 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 24/10/1988 | 31280 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/10/1988 | 08504 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 07/12/1988 | 20146 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 07/12/1988 | 20203 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 20/02/1989 | 31118 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 30/06/1989 | 47411 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 30/08/1989 | 31284 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 08/12/1989 | 20171 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 08/12/1989 | 20202 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 17/01/1990 | 31240 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 22/01/1990 | 31231 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 28/04/1990 | 31320 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 25/05/1990 | 08537 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 13/08/1990 | 47406 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 13/08/1990 | 47407 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 14/09/1990 | 20031 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 10/10/1990 | 20026 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 10/10/1990 | 20053 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 17/11/1990 | 20052 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 60 | Co-Co | on | 03/12/1990 | 60019 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 60 | Co-Co | on | 03/12/1990 | 60032 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 01/01/1991 | 31428 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 04/02/1991 | 20051 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/02/1991 | 47418 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 60 | Co-Co | on | 07/02/1991 | 60027 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 60 | Co-Co | on | 20/02/1991 | 60094 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | on | 08/04/1991 | 31243 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 01/05/1991 | 20228 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 60 | Co-Co | on | 07/05/1991 | 60049 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 60 | Co-Co | on | 07/05/1991 | 60058 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 60 | Co-Co | on | 09/05/1991 | 60052 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 60 | Co-Co | on | 24/05/1991 | 60056 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 09/08/1991 | 47413 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 60 | Co-Co | on | 22/08/1991 | 60066 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 60 | Co-Co | on | 28/08/1991 | 60064 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 19/09/1991 | 20025 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 60 | Co-Co | on | 20/09/1991 | 60067 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/10/1991 | 08508 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 15/11/1991 | 20019 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 15/11/1991 | 20028 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 22/11/1991 | 47311 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 60 | Co-Co | on | 23/11/1991 | 60080 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 60 | Co-Co | on | 26/11/1991 | 60078 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 60 | Co-Co | on | 03/12/1991 | 60081 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 60 | Co-Co | on | 03/12/1991 | 60082 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 60 | Co-Co | on | 13/12/1991 | 60085 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 10/01/1992 | 08436 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 60 | Co-Co | on | 30/01/1992 | 60003 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 10/02/1992 | 08434 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 24/02/1992 | 47417 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 60 | Co-Co | on | 13/03/1992 | 60095 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 16/03/1992 | 31123 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 60 | Co-Co | on | 13/05/1992 | 60096 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 01/06/1992 | 47402 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 05/06/1992 | 47401 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 30/07/1992 | 47380 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 02/10/1992 | 20185 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 60 | Co-Co | on | 08/12/1992 | 60002 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 60 | Co-Co | on | 08/12/1992 | 60008 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 60 | Co-Co | on | 22/12/1992 | 60097 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 60 | Co-Co | on | 22/12/1992 | 60098 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 60 | Co-Co | on | 06/01/1993 | 60014 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 60 | Co-Co | on | 11/01/1993 | 60084 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 60 | Co-Co | on | 29/01/1993 | 60013 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 26/02/1993 | 31196 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 03/03/1993 | 08743 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 60 | Co-Co | on | 24/03/1993 | 60015 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 11/06/1993 | 31234 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 01/03/1995 | 37331 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 24/03/1995 | 37252 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | on | 01/09/1996 | 31455 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 25/08/1998 | 47222 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 25/08/1998 | 47291 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | on | 14/12/1998 | 31242 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 28/01/1999 | 37026 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 01/02/1999 | 31427 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 01/04/1999 | 47299 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 01/07/1999 | 47344 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 01/12/1999 | 37705 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 14/01/2000 | 31238 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 14/01/2000 | 31304 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 14/01/2000 | 47379 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 04/02/2000 | 31247 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 04/02/2000 | 31403 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 26/05/2000 | 31155 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 26/05/2000 | 31232 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 16/06/2000 | 47304 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 01/07/2000 | 37686 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 14/07/2000 | 47277 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 14/07/2000 | 47352 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 01/03/2001 | 47634 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 13/04/2001 | 47276 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 01/01/2003 | 47370 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 15/01/2003 | 37153 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 28/02/2003 | 47312 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 28/02/2004 | 08751 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 30/07/2004 | 31113 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 01/12/2004 | 37717 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 31/01/2005 | 37141 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 31/01/2005 | 47223 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 31/07/2005 | 47331 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 30/11/2005 | 31417 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 30/11/2006 | 47348 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 28/02/2007 | 47219 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 28/02/2007 | 47302 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 28/02/2007 | 47303 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 28/02/2007 | 47307 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 30/04/2007 | 31319 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 31/10/2007 | 47224 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 31/12/2007 | 37055 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 30/09/2008 | 37221 | Condemned |