Depot: Inverness
Type | Class | Wheels | Period | Date | Number | Event | Code | Depot | Length of Stay | Notes |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/06/1946 | 5138 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | on | 03/05/1947 | 566 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | on | 04/10/1947 | 566 | Transfer out to: | 28C | Carstairs | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 27/12/1947 | 4763 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 113 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 14470 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 113 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 14471 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 113 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 14472 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 72 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 14480 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 72 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 14482 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 72 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 14484 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 72 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 14488 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 72 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 14495 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | W | 0-4-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 15051 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | W | 0-4-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 15053 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 439 | 0-4-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 15199 | Snapshot | 27D | Carstairs | ||
Steam | 264 | 0-4-0ST | on | 01/01/1948 | 16011 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 812 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 17587 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Clan Goods | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 17950 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Clan Goods | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 17951 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Clan Goods | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 17954 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Clan Goods | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 17955 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Clan Goods | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 17956 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4771 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4772 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4773 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4798 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4799 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4991 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4992 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5053 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5066 | Snapshot | 22B | Gloucester Barnwood | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5090 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5098 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5122 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5123 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5124 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5136 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5138 | Snapshot | 32A | Inverness | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5138 | Snapshot | 32A | Inverness | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5160 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5192 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5319 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5320 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5360 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5361 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | BEN | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 54397 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | BEN | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 54399 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | BEN | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 54401 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | BEN | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 54403 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | BEN | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 54404 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | BEN | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 54409 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | BEN | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 54415 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | BEN | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 54416 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5476 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5477 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5478 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5479 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 264 | 0-4-0ST | on | 01/01/1948 | 56010 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 782 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 56262 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 782 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 56291 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 782 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 56293 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 782 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 56299 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 782 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 56341 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 812 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 57585 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 812 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 57586 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 812 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 57622 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 812 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 57625 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 652 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 57629 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Clan Goods | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 57953 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7541 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 31/01/1948 | 4783 | Transfer in from: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 31/01/1948 | 4784 | Transfer in from: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 31/01/1948 | 4785 | Transfer in from: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 31/01/1948 | 4763 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 31/01/1948 | 4771 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 31/01/1948 | 4772 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 31/01/1948 | 4773 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 72 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 21/02/1948 | 14488 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Aviemore | ||
Steam | BEN | 4-4-0 | on | 08/05/1948 | 54415 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 12/06/1948 | 5161 | Transfer in from: | 29A | Perth South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 03/07/1948 | 5161 | Transfer out to: | 29A | Perth South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 14/08/1948 | 4788 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 14/08/1948 | 4789 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | BEN | 4-4-0 | on | 21/08/1948 | 54416 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 652 | 0-6-0 | on | 18/09/1948 | 57629 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Clan Goods | 4-6-0 | on | 18/09/1948 | 57953 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | w/e | 09/10/1948 | 40913 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Corkerhill | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | w/e | 09/10/1948 | 915 | Transfer in from: | 28C | Carstairs | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | w/e | 16/10/1948 | 923 | Transfer in from: | 29A | Perth South | ||
Steam | BEN | 4-4-0 | on | 16/10/1948 | 54401 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 113 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 30/10/1948 | 14461 | Transfer in from: | 28C | Carstairs | ||
Steam | 72 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 30/10/1948 | 54491 | Transfer in from: | 31B | Stirling | ||
Steam | 72 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 30/10/1948 | 54496 | Transfer in from: | 31B | Stirling | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | w/e | 30/10/1948 | 924 | Transfer in from: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | w/e | 30/10/1948 | 923 | Transfer out to: | 29A | Perth South | ||
Steam | 113 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 13/11/1948 | 54463 | Transfer in from: | 28C | Carstairs | ||
Steam | 113 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 13/11/1948 | 14461 | Transfer out to: | 28C | Carstairs | ||
Steam | 72 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 27/11/1948 | 14487 | Transfer in from: | 31A | St Rollox (Balornock) | ||
Steam | Highland Clan | 4-6-0 | w/e | 27/11/1948 | 54767 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Aviemore | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | w/e | 27/11/1948 | 40913 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Aviemore | ||
Steam | 72 | 4-4-0 | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 14487 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Inverness | ||
Steam | BEN | 4-4-0 | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 54398 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Aviemore | ||
Steam | Highland Clan | 4-6-0 | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 54767 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Inverness | ||
Steam | 72 | 4-4-0 | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 14487 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Inverness | ||
Steam | Highland Clan | 4-6-0 | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 54767 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Inverness | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | w/e | 18/12/1948 | 915 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Corkerhill | ||
Steam | BEN | 4-4-0 | m/e | 02/1949 | 54397 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | BEN | 4-4-0 | m/e | 02/1949 | 54403 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 25/06/1949 | 45087 | Transfer in from: | 29A | Perth South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 25/06/1949 | 45161 | Transfer in from: | 29A | Perth South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/07/1949 | 45087 | Transfer in from: | 60A | Inverness | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/07/1949 | 45161 | Transfer in from: | 60A | Inverness | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/07/1949 | 45087 | Transfer out to: | 60A | Inverness | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/07/1949 | 45161 | Transfer out to: | 60A | Inverness | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 22/10/1949 | 45087 | Transfer out to: | 64D | Carstairs | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 22/10/1949 | 45161 | Transfer out to: | 64D | Carstairs | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/12/1949 | 45120 | Transfer in from: | 28A | Motherwell | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/12/1949 | 45179 | Transfer in from: | 28A | Motherwell | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/12/1949 | 5018 | Transfer in from: | 28A | Motherwell | ||
Steam | 439 | 0-4-4T | w/e | 17/12/1949 | 55160 | Transfer in from: | 29D | Forfar | ||
Steam | 92 | 0-4-4T | w/e | 24/12/1949 | 55129 | Transfer in from: | 31E | Dawsholm | ||
Steam | Highland Clan | 4-6-0 | m/e | 02/1950 | 54767 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | BEN | 4-4-0 | m/e | 03/1950 | 54409 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 264 | 0-4-0ST | m/e | 03/1950 | 56010 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | G4 | 0-4-4T | w/e | 25/03/1950 | 8108 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 812 | 0-6-0 | on | 13/04/1950 | 57625 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | 812 | 0-6-0 | on | 14/04/1950 | 57622 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | 812 | 0-6-0 | on | 18/04/1950 | 57597 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Aviemore | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 18/04/1950 | 45018 | Transfer out to: | 60B | Aviemore | ||
Steam | 72 | 4-4-0 | on | 18/04/1950 | 54495 | Transfer out to: | 60C | Helmsdale | ||
Steam | 139 | 4-4-0 | on | 15/06/1950 | 54445 | Transfer in from: | 27B | Greenock Ladyburn | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/06/1950 | 45012 | Transfer in from: | 28A | Motherwell | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/06/1950 | 45453 | Transfer in from: | 28A | Motherwell | ||
Steam | 139 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 17/06/1950 | 54445 | Transfer in from: | 60A | Inverness | ||
Steam | 139 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 17/06/1950 | 54445 | Transfer out to: | 60A | Inverness | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 24/06/1950 | 45461 | Transfer in from: | 28A | Motherwell | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 01/07/1950 | 45012 | Transfer in from: | 60A | Inverness | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 01/07/1950 | 45453 | Transfer in from: | 60A | Inverness | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 01/07/1950 | 45012 | Transfer out to: | 60A | Inverness | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 01/07/1950 | 45453 | Transfer out to: | 60A | Inverness | ||
Steam | 92 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 08/1950 | 55129 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Clan Goods | 4-6-0 | m/e | 08/1950 | 57950 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | G4 | 0-4-4T | on | 09/10/1950 | 8108 | Transfer out to: | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | BEN | 4-4-0 | on | 16/10/1950 | 54404 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 812 | 0-6-0 | on | 22/10/1950 | 57622 | Transfer in from: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | 43 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 25/11/1950 | 54458 | Transfer in from: | 60D | Wick | ||
Steam | 43 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 25/11/1950 | 54459 | Transfer in from: | 60D | Wick | ||
Steam | 812 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/11/1950 | 57622 | Transfer out to: | 60D | Wick | ||
Steam | 43 | 4-4-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 54458 | Transfer in from: | 60A | Inverness | ||
Steam | 43 | 4-4-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 54459 | Transfer in from: | 60A | Inverness | ||
Steam | 43 | 4-4-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 54458 | Transfer out to: | 60A | Inverness | ||
Steam | 43 | 4-4-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 54459 | Transfer out to: | 60A | Inverness | ||
Steam | 652 | 0-6-0 | on | 04/02/1951 | 57634 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Aviemore | ||
Steam | 812 | 0-6-0 | on | 04/02/1951 | 57586 | Transfer out to: | 60B | Aviemore | ||
Steam | 652 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/02/1951 | 57634 | Transfer in from: | 60A | Inverness | ||
Steam | 652 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/02/1951 | 57634 | Transfer out to: | 60A | Inverness | ||
Steam | Clan Goods | 4-6-0 | on | 24/05/1951 | 57951 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 812 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/12/1951 | 57622 | Transfer in from: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 45160 | Transfer out to: | 67A | Corkerhill | ||
Steam | BEN | 4-4-0 | m/e | 05/1952 | 54399 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 72 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 54496 | Transfer out to: | 60D | Wick | ||
Steam | 812 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 57622 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | Clan Goods | 4-6-0 | on | 27/05/1952 | 57956 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Clan Goods | 4-6-0 | on | 27/06/1952 | 57955 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 439 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 55216 | Transfer in from: | 29A | Perth South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 44722 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 45012 | Transfer out to: | 68A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | Clan Goods | 4-6-0 | on | 13/10/1952 | 57954 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 44718 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 44719 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 44724 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 45122 | Transfer out to: | 68A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 45136 | Transfer out to: | 60B | Aviemore | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 45138 | Transfer out to: | 68A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 44723 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 140 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 54439 | Transfer in from: | 60D | Wick | ||
Steam | 812 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 57622 | Transfer in from: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | 652 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 57632 | Transfer in from: | 27A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | 43 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 54459 | Transfer out to: | 60D | Wick | ||
Steam | 139 | 4-4-0 | on | 19/12/1952 | 54445 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 45120 | Transfer out to: | 68A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | BEN | 4-4-0 | m/e | 03/1953 | 54398 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 21/03/1953 | 45053 | Transfer out to: | 63A | Perth South | ||
Steam | 113 | 4-4-0 | 8w/e | 21/03/1953 | 54472 | Transfer out to: | 60E | Forres | ||
Steam | 72 | 4-4-0 | 8w/e | 21/03/1953 | 54491 | Transfer out to: | 60D | Wick | ||
Steam | 72 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 54496 | Transfer in from: | 60D | Wick | ||
Steam | 652 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 57632 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | 812 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 57622 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | 782 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 11/07/1953 | 56327 | Transfer in from: | 65D | Dawsholm | ||
Steam | 113 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 08/08/1953 | 54471 | Transfer out to: | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | 782 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 56327 | Transfer out to: | 65D | Dawsholm | ||
Steam | 113 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 54471 | Transfer in from: | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | 439 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 55231 | Transfer in from: | 29C | Dundee West | ||
Steam | 812 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/02/1954 | 57622 | Transfer in from: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | 812 | 0-6-0 | 8w/e | 17/04/1954 | 57622 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | 72 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 07/08/1954 | 54493 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Aviemore | ||
Steam | 300 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/08/1954 | 57661 | Transfer in from: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Steam | 113 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 07/08/1954 | 54471 | Transfer out to: | 60E | Forres | ||
Steam | 652 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/08/1954 | 57634 | Transfer out to: | 61C | Keith | ||
Steam | 812 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/10/1954 | 57622 | Transfer in from: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | 439 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 30/10/1954 | 55231 | Transfer out to: | 67C | Ayr | ||
Steam | 113 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 27/11/1954 | 54470 | Transfer out to: | 60C | Helmsdale | ||
Steam | 140 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 22/01/1955 | 54439 | Transfer out to: | 60D | Wick | ||
Steam | 439 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 14/05/1955 | 55162 | Transfer in from: | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | 812 | 0-6-0 | 8w/e | 09/07/1955 | 57622 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | 812 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/10/1955 | 57622 | Transfer in from: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | 782 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 18/02/1956 | 56305 | Transfer in from: | 27A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 18/02/1956 | 47541 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | 812 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/03/1956 | 57622 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | 439 | 0-4-4T | on | 08/05/1956 | 55162 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | W | 0-4-4T | w/e | 22/06/1956 | 55051 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | 8w/e | 22/12/1956 | 78052 | Transfer in from: | 66B | Motherwell | ||
Steam | W | 0-4-4T | on | 16/01/1957 | 55053 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | m/e | 02/1957 | 78052 | Transfer out to: | 60C | Helmsdale | ||
Steam | 782 | 0-6-0T | m/e | 02/1957 | 56299 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 72 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 16/03/1957 | 54482 | Transfer out to: | 60B | Aviemore | ||
Steam | 782 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 11/05/1957 | 56300 | Transfer in from: | 65D | Dawsholm | ||
Steam | 113 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 08/06/1957 | 54466 | Transfer in from: | 60B | Aviemore | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/07/1957 | 73106 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/07/1957 | 73107 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Steam | 812 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/09/1957 | 57575 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Corkerhill | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/10/1957 | 45117 | Transfer in from: | 63A | Perth South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/10/1957 | 45460 | Transfer in from: | 63A | Perth South | ||
Steam | 812 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/10/1957 | 57594 | Transfer in from: | 67A | Corkerhill | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/10/1957 | 73106 | Transfer out to: | 63A | Perth South | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/10/1957 | 73107 | Transfer out to: | 63A | Perth South | ||
Steam | 43 | 4-4-0 | on | 28/12/1957 | 54458 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 113 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 10/05/1958 | 54466 | Transfer out to: | 60B | Aviemore | ||
Diesel | 06 | 0-4-0 | on | 19/06/1958 | D2410 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/07/1958 | 45458 | Transfer in from: | 29A | Perth South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/07/1958 | 45459 | Transfer in from: | 29A | Perth South | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | 4w/e | 05/07/1958 | D5511 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 06 | 0-4-0 | on | 31/07/1958 | D2411 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | 4w/e | 13/09/1958 | D5511 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 06 | 0-4-0 | on | 18/09/1958 | D2412 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 439 | 0-4-4T | on | 01/10/1958 | 55160 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 06 | 0-4-0 | on | 08/10/1958 | D2413 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 439 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 25/10/1958 | 55227 | Transfer in from: | 67A | Corkerhill | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/10/1958 | 45458 | Transfer out to: | 63A | Perth South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/10/1958 | 45459 | Transfer out to: | 63A | Perth South | ||
Steam | 782 | 0-6-0T | on | 05/11/1958 | 56293 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 439 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 22/11/1958 | 55198 | Transfer in from: | 63C | Forfar | ||
Steam | 439 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 22/11/1958 | 55226 | Transfer in from: | 63C | Forfar | ||
Steam | 782 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 22/11/1958 | 56291 | Transfer out to: | 60E | Forres | ||
Steam | 264 | 0-4-0ST | on | 06/01/1959 | 56011 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 782 | 0-6-0T | on | 19/01/1959 | 56262 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 812 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/03/1959 | 57597 | Transfer out to: | 60B | Aviemore | ||
Steam | 72 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 11/04/1959 | 54484 | Transfer out to: | 60B | Aviemore | ||
Diesel | 06 | 0-4-0 | 4w/e | 09/05/1959 | D2423 | Transfer in from: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Steam | 2P | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 06/06/1959 | 55269 | Transfer in from: | 60E | Forres | ||
Steam | 812 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 10/1959 | 57575 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 72 | 4-4-0 | on | 20/10/1959 | 54496 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 812 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/12/1959 | 57605 | Transfer in from: | 60C | Helmsdale | ||
Steam | 439 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 19/12/1959 | 55226 | Transfer out to: | 63A | Perth South | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 13/02/1960 | D5346 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 18/02/1960 | D8032 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 18/02/1960 | D8033 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 12/03/1960 | D8034 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 12/03/1960 | D5338 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 12/03/1960 | D5339 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 12/03/1960 | D5340 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 12/03/1960 | D5341 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 12/03/1960 | D5342 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 12/03/1960 | D5343 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 12/03/1960 | D5344 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 12/03/1960 | D5345 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/03/1960 | 45066 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/03/1960 | 45090 | Transfer out to: | 63A | Perth South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/03/1960 | 45478 | Transfer out to: | 63A | Perth South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/04/1960 | 45098 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/04/1960 | 45320 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 09/04/1960 | D5340 | Transfer out to: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 09/04/1960 | D5341 | Transfer out to: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 09/04/1960 | D5342 | Transfer out to: | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 09/04/1960 | D5343 | Transfer out to: | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 09/04/1960 | D5344 | Transfer out to: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 09/04/1960 | D5345 | Transfer out to: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | on | 23/04/1960 | D5114 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | on | 30/04/1960 | D5115 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 812 | 0-6-0 | on | 05/05/1960 | 57605 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | on | 07/05/1960 | D5116 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | on | 14/05/1960 | D5117 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | on | 21/05/1960 | D5118 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | on | 28/05/1960 | D5119 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | on | 04/06/1960 | D5120 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 21 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 04/06/1960 | D6146 | Transfer in from: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/06/1960 | 44723 | Transfer out to: | 67A | Corkerhill | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/06/1960 | 44798 | Transfer out to: | 67A | Corkerhill | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/06/1960 | 45124 | Transfer out to: | 67A | Corkerhill | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/06/1960 | 45460 | Transfer out to: | 67A | Corkerhill | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | on | 11/06/1960 | D5121 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | on | 18/06/1960 | D5122 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | on | 25/06/1960 | D5123 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | on | 02/07/1960 | D5124 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 02/07/1960 | D5320 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 02/07/1960 | D5321 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 02/07/1960 | D5322 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 02/07/1960 | D5323 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 02/07/1960 | D5324 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 02/07/1960 | D5325 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 02/07/1960 | D5328 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 02/07/1960 | D5333 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 02/07/1960 | D5335 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 02/07/1960 | D5337 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 02/07/1960 | D5340 | Transfer in from: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 02/07/1960 | D5341 | Transfer in from: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 02/07/1960 | D5342 | Transfer in from: | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 02/07/1960 | D5343 | Transfer in from: | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 02/07/1960 | D5344 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 02/07/1960 | D5345 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/07/1960 | 44992 | Transfer out to: | 68C | Stranraer | ||
Diesel | 21 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 02/07/1960 | D6146 | Transfer out to: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | on | 14/07/1960 | D5125 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | on | 23/07/1960 | D5126 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | on | 30/07/1960 | D5127 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/07/1960 | 44788 | Transfer out to: | 63A | Perth South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/07/1960 | 44789 | Transfer out to: | 68C | Stranraer | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/07/1960 | 45192 | Transfer out to: | 63A | Perth South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/07/1960 | 45461 | Transfer out to: | 63A | Perth South | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | on | 13/08/1960 | D5128 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 72 | 4-4-0 | on | 24/08/1960 | 54480 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | on | 27/08/1960 | D5129 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/08/1960 | 44722 | Transfer out to: | 63A | Perth South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/08/1960 | 44724 | Transfer out to: | 63A | Perth South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/08/1960 | 44799 | Transfer out to: | 63A | Perth South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/08/1960 | 45179 | Transfer out to: | 63A | Perth South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/08/1960 | 45319 | Transfer out to: | 63A | Perth South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/08/1960 | 45360 | Transfer out to: | 63A | Perth South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/08/1960 | 45361 | Transfer out to: | 63A | Perth South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/08/1960 | 45453 | Transfer out to: | 63A | Perth South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/08/1960 | 45476 | Transfer out to: | 63A | Perth South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/08/1960 | 45477 | Transfer out to: | 63A | Perth South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/08/1960 | 45479 | Transfer out to: | 63A | Perth South | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | on | 03/09/1960 | D5130 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | on | 17/09/1960 | D5131 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | on | 23/09/1960 | D5132 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 782 | 0-6-0T | m/e | 11/1960 | 56300 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 19/11/1960 | D5326 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 19/11/1960 | D5329 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 19/11/1960 | D5336 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 19/11/1960 | D5117 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 19/11/1960 | D5344 | Transfer out to: | 65B | St Rollox (Balornock) | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 17/12/1960 | D5116 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 11/02/1961 | D5344 | Transfer in from: | 65B | St Rollox (Balornock) | ||
Steam | 782 | 0-6-0T | on | 08/03/1961 | 56341 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 72 | 4-4-0 | on | 29/03/1961 | 54487 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 06/05/1961 | D8034 | Transfer out to: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Steam | 439 | 0-4-4T | on | 18/05/1961 | 55198 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 06/1961 | D5117 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 03/06/1961 | D5116 | Transfer in from: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/06/1961 | 44718 | Transfer out to: | 67B | Hurlford | ||
Steam | 300 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/06/1961 | 57661 | Transfer out to: | 68B | Dumfries | ||
Steam | 439 | 0-4-4T | on | 26/07/1961 | 55199 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/09/1961 | 44258 | Transfer in from: | 29A | Perth South | ||
Steam | 812 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/09/1961 | 57587 | Transfer out to: | 63C | Oban | ||
Steam | 439 | 0-4-4T | on | 02/10/1961 | 55216 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/11/1961 | D4095 | Transfer in from: | 63B | Fort William | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/11/1961 | D4096 | Transfer in from: | 63B | Fort William | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/11/1961 | 45470 | Transfer in from: | 29A | Perth South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/11/1961 | 45479 | Transfer in from: | 63A | Perth South | ||
Steam | 72 | 4-4-0 | on | 27/11/1961 | 54493 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 812 | 0-6-0 | on | 27/11/1961 | 57585 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 782 | 0-6-0T | on | 04/12/1961 | 56305 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 439 | 0-4-4T | on | 18/12/1961 | 55227 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2P | 0-4-4T | on | 26/03/1962 | 55269 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 21/04/1962 | D5318 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 21/04/1962 | D5319 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/04/1962 | 44784 | Transfer out to: | 67A | Corkerhill | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/04/1962 | 44785 | Transfer out to: | 67A | Corkerhill | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/04/1962 | 45117 | Transfer out to: | 67A | Corkerhill | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/04/1962 | 45123 | Transfer out to: | 67A | Corkerhill | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/04/1962 | 45470 | Transfer out to: | 67A | Corkerhill | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/04/1962 | 45479 | Transfer out to: | 67A | Corkerhill | ||
Steam | 113 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 21/04/1962 | 54463 | Transfer out to: | 63A | Perth South | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 29/04/1962 | 60924 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/05/1962 | 44991 | Transfer out to: | 66B | Motherwell | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 21/05/1962 | 44258 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 06 | 0-4-0 | 4w/e | 24/11/1962 | D2444 | Transfer in from: | 66B | Motherwell | ||
Steam | 812 | 0-6-0 | on | 29/12/1962 | 57594 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 06 | 0-4-0 | 4w/e | 05/10/1963 | D2411 | Transfer out to: | 63A | Perth South | ||
Diesel | 06 | 0-4-0 | 4w/e | 05/10/1963 | D2412 | Transfer out to: | 63A | Perth South | ||
Diesel | 06 | 0-4-0 | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | D2444 | Transfer out to: | 63A | Perth South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | m/e | 05/1964 | 44783 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 06 | 0-4-0 | 4w/e | 27/06/1964 | D2410 | Transfer out to: | 66C | Hamilton (West) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/06/1964 | 44719 | Transfer out to: | 65F | Grangemouth | ||
Diesel | 06 | 0-4-0 | 5w/e | 30/01/1965 | D2422 | Transfer in from: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Diesel | 06 | 0-4-0 | 5w/e | 30/01/1965 | D2424 | Transfer in from: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | 5w/e | 30/10/1965 | D8031 | Transfer in from: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | 5w/e | 30/10/1965 | D8034 | Transfer in from: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 5w/e | 30/10/1965 | D5318 | Transfer out to: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 5w/e | 30/10/1965 | D5319 | Transfer out to: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 06 | 0-4-0 | 8w/e | 25/06/1966 | D2413 | Transfer out to: | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | 9w/e | 26/11/1966 | D8031 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | 9w/e | 26/11/1966 | D8032 | Transfer out to: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | 9w/e | 26/11/1966 | D8033 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | 9w/e | 26/11/1966 | D8034 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 5w/e | 31/12/1966 | D5318 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 5w/e | 31/12/1966 | D5319 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 5w/e | 29/04/1967 | D5318 | Transfer out to: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 5w/e | 29/04/1967 | D5319 | Transfer out to: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 06 | 0-4-0 | 4w/e | 24/06/1967 | D2422 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 06 | 0-4-0 | 4w/e | 24/06/1967 | D2424 | Transfer out to: | 65F | Grangemouth | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 26/08/1967 | D5316 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 26/08/1967 | D5317 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 26/08/1967 | D5318 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 26/08/1967 | D5319 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 27/01/1968 | D5316 | Transfer out to: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 27/01/1968 | D5317 | Transfer out to: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 27/01/1968 | D5318 | Transfer out to: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/02/1968 | D3896 | Transfer in from: | 60B | Aviemore | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/04/1968 | D3887 | Transfer in from: | 63A | Perth South | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 01/06/1968 | D3548 | Transfer in from: | 64H | Leith Central | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 01/06/1968 | D3887 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 3w/e | 29/06/1968 | D7616 | Transfer in from: | D08 | Liverpool Division | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | 3w/e | 29/06/1968 | D8080 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 14/09/1968 | D7616 | Transfer out to: | D10 | Preston Division | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | on | 02/10/1968 | D5122 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 26/10/1968 | D5318 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 26/10/1968 | D8080 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 30/11/1968 | D3660 | Transfer in from: | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 5w/e | 30/11/1968 | D5318 | Transfer out to: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 5w/e | 30/11/1968 | D5319 | Transfer out to: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/12/1968 | D4096 | Transfer out to: | 64H | Leith Central | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/01/1969 | D4095 | Transfer out to: | 63A | Perth South | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 25/01/1969 | D5320 | Transfer out to: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 01/03/1969 | D3551 | Transfer in from: | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 5w/e | 31/05/1969 | D5321 | Transfer out to: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 5w/e | 31/05/1969 | D5322 | Transfer out to: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 5w/e | 31/05/1969 | D5323 | Transfer out to: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 5w/e | 31/05/1969 | D5324 | Transfer out to: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 5w/e | 31/05/1969 | D5325 | Transfer out to: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 5w/e | 31/05/1969 | D5326 | Transfer out to: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 5w/e | 31/05/1969 | D5328 | Transfer out to: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 5w/e | 31/05/1969 | D5329 | Transfer out to: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/06/1969 | D3214 | Transfer in from: | 67C | Ayr | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/06/1969 | D3555 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/12/1969 | D3214 | Transfer out to: | 63A | Perth South | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/02/1970 | D3548 | Transfer out to: | 64H | Leith Central | ||
Diesel | 06 | 0-4-0 | 5w/e | 03/07/1971 | D2423 | Transfer out to: | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | on | 11/09/1971 | D5131 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 30/10/1971 | D3787 | Transfer in from: | 15C | Leicester Midland | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 26/02/1972 | D3551 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 26/02/1972 | D3555 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 29/04/1972 | D5113 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | on | 09/10/1972 | D5114 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 24/02/1973 | D5101 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 24/02/1973 | D5329 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 24/02/1973 | D5101 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 19/05/1973 | D5327 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 03/11/1973 | D5113 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 08/12/1973 | D1635 | Transfer in from: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 29/12/1973 | 47516 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 29/12/1973 | D1635 | Transfer out to: | HA | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 23/02/1974 | D5112 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 23/02/1974 | D5113 | Transfer in from: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 24102 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 24103 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 24104 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 5w/e | 29/06/1974 | 47516 | Transfer out to: | HA | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 28/12/1974 | 24111 | Transfer in from: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/03/1975 | 08851 | Transfer in from: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/03/1975 | 08505 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 29/03/1975 | 24111 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 24/05/1975 | 24110 | Transfer in from: | HA | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 26/07/1975 | 08855 | Transfer in from: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 26/07/1975 | 08851 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 23/08/1975 | 24104 | To Store | ||||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 25/10/1975 | 24102 | To Store | ||||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 25/10/1975 | 24103 | To Store | ||||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 25/10/1975 | 24132 | To Store | ||||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 25/10/1975 | 26008 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 25/10/1975 | 26011 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 25/10/1975 | 26015 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 25/10/1975 | 26019 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 25/10/1975 | 26021 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 25/10/1975 | 26022 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 25/10/1975 | 26023 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 25/10/1975 | 26024 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 25/10/1975 | 26025 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 25/10/1975 | 26026 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 25/10/1975 | 24110 | Transfer out to: | HA | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 25/10/1975 | 24113 | Transfer out to: | HA | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 25/10/1975 | 24115 | Transfer out to: | HA | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 25/10/1975 | 24116 | Transfer out to: | HA | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 25/10/1975 | 24118 | Transfer out to: | HA | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 25/10/1975 | 24120 | Transfer out to: | HA | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 25/10/1975 | 24121 | Transfer out to: | HA | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 25/10/1975 | 24123 | Transfer out to: | HA | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 25/10/1975 | 24125 | Transfer out to: | HA | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 25/10/1975 | 24126 | Transfer out to: | HA | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 25/10/1975 | 24128 | Transfer out to: | HA | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 3w/e | 15/11/1975 | 25030 | Transfer in from: | HA | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 3w/e | 15/11/1975 | 25031 | Transfer in from: | HA | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 3w/e | 15/11/1975 | 25092 | Transfer in from: | HA | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 3w/e | 15/11/1975 | 25093 | Transfer in from: | HA | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 3w/e | 15/11/1975 | 25096 | Transfer in from: | HA | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 3w/e | 15/11/1975 | 26009 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 3w/e | 15/11/1975 | 26010 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 3w/e | 15/11/1975 | 26012 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 3w/e | 15/11/1975 | 26013 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 3w/e | 15/11/1975 | 26014 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 3w/e | 15/11/1975 | 26017 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 3w/e | 15/11/1975 | 26018 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 3w/e | 15/11/1975 | 26020 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 3w/e | 15/11/1975 | 26028 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | 3w/e | 15/11/1975 | 24112 | Transfer out to: | HA | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | 3w/e | 15/11/1975 | 24119 | Transfer out to: | HA | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | 3w/e | 15/11/1975 | 24124 | Transfer out to: | HA | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | 3w/e | 15/11/1975 | 24127 | Transfer out to: | HA | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | 3w/e | 15/11/1975 | 24129 | Transfer out to: | HA | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | 3w/e | 15/11/1975 | 24130 | Transfer out to: | HA | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | 2w/e | 29/11/1975 | 24117 | Transfer out to: | HA | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 29/05/1976 | 25030 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 29/05/1976 | 25031 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 29/05/1976 | 25092 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 29/05/1976 | 25093 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 29/05/1976 | 25096 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 5w/e | 03/07/1976 | 25062 | Transfer in from: | HA | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 5w/e | 03/07/1976 | 25064 | Transfer in from: | SP | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 5w/e | 03/07/1976 | 25083 | Transfer in from: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 3w/e | 24/07/1976 | 25092 | Transfer in from: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 3w/e | 24/07/1976 | 25093 | Transfer in from: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 6w/e | 04/09/1976 | 25092 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 6w/e | 04/09/1976 | 25093 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | m/e | 12/1976 | 26020 | To Store | ||||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | m/e | 01/1977 | 26009 | To Store | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 04/1977 | 08882 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | m/e | 05/1977 | 25068 | Transfer in from: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | m/e | 05/1977 | 25226 | Transfer in from: | HA | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | m/e | 05/1977 | 25228 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | m/e | 05/1977 | 25229 | Transfer in from: | HA | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | m/e | 05/1977 | 25231 | Transfer in from: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | m/e | 05/1977 | 25233 | Transfer in from: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | m/e | 05/1977 | 25234 | Transfer in from: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | m/e | 05/1977 | 25238 | Transfer in from: | HA | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 05/1977 | 08855 | Transfer out to: | AB | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | m/e | 08/1977 | 26017 | To Store | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 31/12/1977 | 08738 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 31/12/1977 | 08882 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 14/07/1980 | 25068 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 13/10/1980 | 25238 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 14/12/1980 | 25083 | Transfer out to: | SP | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | on | 01/02/1981 | 26022 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 31/05/1981 | 08728 | Transfer out to: | AB | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | m/e | 07/1981 | 25062 | Transfer out to: | KD | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 03/08/1981 | 25226 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 09/1981 | 08738 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | m/e | 09/1981 | 26023 | Transfer out to: | HA | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | m/e | 09/1981 | 26025 | Transfer out to: | HA | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | m/e | 09/1981 | 26026 | Transfer out to: | HA | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 27 | Bo-Bo | on | 05/10/1981 | 27002 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 27 | Bo-Bo | on | 05/10/1981 | 27106 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 27 | Bo-Bo | on | 05/10/1981 | 27109 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 05/10/1981 | 37014 | Transfer in from: | SF | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | on | 31/01/1982 | 26012 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | on | 31/01/1982 | 26018 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 13/03/1983 | 25233 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | on | 04/07/1983 | 26045 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | on | 17/01/1984 | 26044 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 20/03/1984 | 25228 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 27/02/1985 | 25234 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | on | 18/03/1985 | 26013 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | on | 18/03/1985 | 26019 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | on | 18/03/1985 | 26033 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 20/05/1985 | 25229 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 23/08/1985 | 25231 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 09/12/1985 | 25064 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 27 | Bo-Bo | on | 06/01/1986 | 27002 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 27 | Bo-Bo | on | 01/05/1987 | 27053 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 27 | Bo-Bo | on | 01/07/1987 | 27050 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 37070 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 37175 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 37196 | Transfer in from: | LE | Landore | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 37251 | Transfer in from: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 37285 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 47482 | Transfer in from: | LE | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 47568 | Transfer in from: | GD | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 47569 | Transfer in from: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 47587 | Transfer in from: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | on | 05/10/1987 | 26010 | To Store | ||||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | on | 05/10/1987 | 26014 | To Store | ||||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | on | 05/10/1987 | 26027 | To Store | ||||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | on | 05/10/1987 | 26039 | To Store | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 37109 | Transfer in from: | MR | March | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 37110 | Transfer in from: | MR | March | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 37324 | Transfer in from: | SF | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 47482 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 47569 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 47587 | Transfer out to: | OC | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | on | 13/10/1988 | 26029 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | on | 19/04/1991 | 26046 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | on | 23/06/1991 | 26015 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | on | 01/10/1991 | 26021 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | on | 02/10/1991 | 26028 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | on | 09/10/1992 | 26024 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | on | 09/10/1992 | 26042 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | on | 19/10/1992 | 26038 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | on | 24/11/1992 | 26011 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | on | 24/11/1992 | 26041 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | on | 04/12/1992 | 26040 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | on | 10/12/1992 | 26035 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | on | 19/01/1993 | 26043 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | on | 12/03/1993 | 26008 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | on | 04/10/1993 | 26036 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | on | 04/10/1993 | 26037 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 01/08/1994 | 37285 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 19/05/1996 | 37070 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 17/06/1997 | 37099 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 14/07/2000 | 37110 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 07/12/2001 | 37251 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 01/10/2002 | 47568 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 01/01/2005 | 37109 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 31/08/2006 | 37175 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 30/09/2008 | 37196 | Condemned |