Depot: Laira
Type | Class | Wheels | Period | Date | Number | Event | Code | Depot | Length of Stay | Notes |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | Star | 4-6-0 | on | 18/05/1907 | 4009 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | on | 08/09/1907 | 2922 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | on | 13/09/1907 | 2923 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Star | 4-6-0 | on | 03/11/1910 | 4032 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Star | 4-6-0 | on | 30/12/1910 | 4037 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Star | 4-6-0 | on | 14/01/1911 | 4009 | Transfer out to: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Star | 4-6-0 | on | 20/07/1911 | 4009 | Transfer in from: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Star | 4-6-0 | on | 07/06/1913 | 4037 | Transfer out to: | SDN | Swindon | ||
Steam | Star | 4-6-0 | on | 17/06/1913 | 4037 | Transfer in from: | SDN | Swindon | ||
Steam | Star | 4-6-0 | m/e | 12/1913 | 4037 | Transfer out to: | EXE | Exeter | ||
Steam | Star | 4-6-0 | on | 23/06/1917 | 4032 | Transfer out to: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Star | 4-6-0 | on | 16/02/1918 | 4009 | Transfer out to: | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Star | 4-6-0 | on | 28/08/1918 | 4009 | Transfer in from: | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Star | 4-6-0 | on | 06/01/1922 | 4009 | Transfer out to: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Star | 4-6-0 | on | 09/06/1923 | 4009 | Transfer in from: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Star | 4-6-0 | on | 14/01/1925 | 4032 | Transfer in from: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 30/05/1925 | 4084 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 10/06/1925 | 4085 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 20/06/1925 | 4086 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 27/06/1925 | 4087 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Star | 4-6-0 | m/e | 07/1925 | 4032 | Transfer out to: | EXE | Exeter | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 25/07/1925 | 4088 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Star | 4-6-0 | on | 10/04/1926 | 4009 | Transfer out to: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 13/04/1926 | 4079 | Transfer in from: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/04/1926 | 4075 | Transfer in from: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 16/04/1926 | 4032 | Transfer in from: | EXE | Exeter | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 16/06/1926 | 4095 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 23/06/1926 | 4096 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 25/06/1926 | 4009 | Transfer in from: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 25/06/1926 | 4079 | Transfer out to: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 02/09/1926 | 4080 | Transfer in from: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 16/04/1927 | 4087 | Transfer out to: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 24/05/1927 | 4087 | Transfer in from: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 16/06/1927 | 4009 | Transfer out to: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 30/06/1927 | 5007 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 30/06/1927 | 5008 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 06/07/1927 | 5009 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 07/07/1927 | 5004 | Transfer in from: | TN | Taunton | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 18/08/1927 | 4075 | Transfer out to: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 09/1927 | 5009 | Transfer out to: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 02/04/1928 | 4096 | Transfer out to: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 16/05/1928 | 4095 | Transfer out to: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 08/1928 | 4087 | Transfer out to: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 03/08/1928 | 4080 | Transfer out to: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 14/01/1929 | 4088 | Transfer out to: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 27/03/1929 | 4080 | Transfer in from: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 27/03/1929 | 4032 | Transfer out to: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 13/05/1929 | 4082 | Transfer in from: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 09/1929 | 4086 | Transfer out to: | EXE | Exeter | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 02/12/1929 | 4084 | Transfer out to: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 19/12/1929 | 4086 | Transfer in from: | EXE | Exeter | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 22/12/1929 | 4094 | Transfer in from: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/03/1930 | 4096 | Transfer in from: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 01/04/1930 | 4085 | Transfer out to: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 26/04/1930 | 4080 | Transfer out to: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 21/07/1930 | 5004 | Transfer out to: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 29/08/1930 | 5002 | Transfer in from: | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 09/1930 | 5005 | Transfer in from: | TN | Taunton | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 06/12/1930 | 4009 | Transfer in from: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 20/12/1930 | 5008 | Transfer out to: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 23/12/1930 | 5005 | Transfer out to: | TN | Taunton | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 01/1931 | 5005 | Transfer in from: | TN | Taunton | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 07/02/1931 | 4084 | Transfer in from: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 26/03/1931 | 4094 | Transfer out to: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 04/04/1931 | 4096 | Transfer out to: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 26/05/1931 | 4095 | Transfer in from: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1931 | 5010 | Transfer in from: | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 20/06/1931 | 4090 | Transfer in from: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 13/08/1931 | 4084 | Transfer out to: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 18/08/1931 | 4087 | Transfer in from: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 23/08/1931 | 4082 | Transfer out to: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 09/1931 | 4095 | Transfer out to: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 03/09/1931 | 4009 | Transfer out to: | EXE | Exeter | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 07/09/1931 | 4086 | Transfer out to: | CARM | Carmarthen | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 08/01/1932 | 4081 | Transfer in from: | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 21/05/1932 | 5005 | Transfer out to: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 07/07/1932 | 5014 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 07/07/1932 | 4094 | Transfer in from: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 29/07/1932 | 4087 | Transfer out to: | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 08/1932 | 4081 | Transfer out to: | EXE | Exeter | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 05/08/1932 | 5020 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 17/08/1932 | 5021 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 19/08/1932 | 5019 | Transfer in from: | SDN | Swindon | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/10/1932 | 5007 | Transfer out to: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 05/11/1932 | 4081 | Transfer in from: | EXE | Exeter | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 23/12/1932 | 5002 | Transfer out to: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 29/12/1932 | 4080 | Transfer in from: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 02/1933 | 5000 | Transfer in from: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 10/03/1933 | 5021 | Transfer out to: | SDN | Swindon | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 31/03/1933 | 5021 | Transfer in from: | SDN | Swindon | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 04/1933 | 4081 | Transfer out to: | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 01/04/1933 | 4032 | Transfer in from: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 06/1933 | 5006 | Transfer in from: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 07/1933 | 5013 | Transfer in from: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 10/1933 | 4077 | Transfer in from: | CARM | Carmarthen | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 11/1933 | 5019 | Transfer out to: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 12/1933 | 4080 | Transfer out to: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 12/1933 | 5014 | Transfer out to: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 19/12/1933 | 5010 | Transfer out to: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/01/1934 | 4092 | Transfer in from: | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 18/01/1934 | 4095 | Transfer in from: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 18/01/1934 | 4090 | Transfer out to: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 18/02/1934 | 5020 | Transfer out to: | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 28/04/1934 | 5024 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 26/05/1934 | 5028 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 01/06/1934 | 5024 | Transfer out to: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 19/06/1934 | 4091 | Transfer in from: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 25/06/1934 | 4088 | Transfer in from: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 25/06/1934 | 4094 | Transfer out to: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 29/06/1934 | 5006 | Transfer out to: | LDR | Landore | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 03/07/1934 | 5013 | Transfer out to: | EXE | Exeter | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 10/1934 | 5011 | Transfer in from: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | m/e | 10/1934 | 2923 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 03/10/1934 | 4091 | Transfer out to: | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 10/10/1934 | 4094 | Transfer in from: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 20/12/1934 | 5009 | Transfer in from: | LDR | Landore | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 28/12/1934 | 4083 | Transfer in from: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 29/12/1934 | 5017 | Transfer in from: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 01/1935 | 5017 | Transfer out to: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 09/01/1935 | 5021 | Transfer out to: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 01/02/1935 | 5021 | Transfer in from: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 08/03/1935 | 5007 | Transfer in from: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 14/03/1935 | 4077 | Transfer out to: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 05/1935 | 4088 | Transfer out to: | PZ | Penzance | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 19/05/1935 | 4095 | Transfer out to: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 27/06/1935 | 5007 | Transfer out to: | SRD | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 11/07/1935 | 5041 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 03/08/1935 | 4088 | Transfer in from: | PZ | Penzance | ||
Steam | 1361 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | 1362 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | 2116 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | 4526 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | 4598 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | 4969 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | 8381 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 04/12/1935 | 5009 | Transfer out to: | RDG | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 07/12/1935 | 5009 | Transfer in from: | RDG | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | 1854 | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 14/12/1935 | 1761 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 14/12/1935 | 4545 | Transfer in from: | la | Moorswater | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 14/12/1935 | 4598 | Transfer out to: | la | Moorswater | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 26/12/1935 | 5015 | Transfer in from: | EXE | Exeter | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 01/1936 | 5009 | Transfer out to: | EXE | Exeter | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 06/01/1936 | 4097 | Transfer in from: | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | 1901 | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 11/01/1936 | 1922 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 02/1936 | 5013 | Transfer in from: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | 4954 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 08/02/1936 | 4083 | Transfer out to: | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 05/03/1936 | 5017 | Transfer in from: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 07/03/1936 | 4565 | Transfer in from: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/03/1936 | 4982 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/03/1936 | 5902 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 17/03/1936 | 5021 | Transfer out to: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | 1901 | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 04/1936 | 1922 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 19/04/1936 | 5000 | Transfer out to: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 13/12/1936 | 5011 | Transfer out to: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 19/01/1937 | 5016 | Transfer in from: | PZ | Penzance | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 03/03/1937 | 4088 | Transfer out to: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 22/03/1937 | 4090 | Transfer in from: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 20/04/1937 | 5024 | Transfer in from: | PZ | Penzance | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 08/07/1937 | 4093 | Transfer in from: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 08/07/1937 | 5017 | Transfer out to: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 29/08/1937 | 5021 | Transfer in from: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 07/11/1937 | 4094 | Transfer out to: | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 13/12/1937 | 5019 | Transfer in from: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 01/1938 | 5016 | Transfer out to: | PZ | Penzance | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 03/01/1938 | 5028 | Transfer out to: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 03/1938 | 4093 | Transfer out to: | PZ | Penzance | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 04/1938 | 4090 | Transfer out to: | EXE | Exeter | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 05/1938 | 4090 | Transfer in from: | EXE | Exeter | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 07/1938 | 4032 | Transfer out to: | TR | Truro | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 13/07/1938 | 5073 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 24/09/1938 | 4098 | Transfer in from: | EXE | Exeter | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 10/1938 | 4032 | Transfer in from: | TR | Truro | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 12/1938 | 5073 | Transfer out to: | SRD | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 11/12/1938 | 5015 | Transfer out to: | 4A | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 17/12/1938 | 5021 | Transfer out to: | 4A | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 30/12/1938 | 4090 | Transfer out to: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 01/1939 | 5057 | Transfer in from: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 10/01/1939 | 4090 | Transfer in from: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 02/1939 | 4088 | Transfer in from: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 05/02/1939 | 5019 | Transfer out to: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 21/02/1939 | 4092 | Transfer out to: | WOS | Worcester | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 03/03/1939 | 5009 | Transfer in from: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 18/04/1939 | 4098 | Transfer out to: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 01/05/1939 | 5090 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 05/05/1939 | 4098 | Transfer in from: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 13/05/1939 | 4093 | Transfer in from: | PZ | Penzance | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/05/1939 | 5078 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 07/1939 | 5013 | Transfer out to: | PZ | Penzance | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 06/07/1939 | 5095 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 08/1939 | 4097 | Transfer out to: | TR | Truro | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 19/12/1939 | 5011 | Transfer in from: | EXE | Exeter | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 14/01/1940 | 4077 | Transfer in from: | PZ | Penzance | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 03/02/1940 | 5041 | Transfer out to: | PZ | Penzance | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 06/1940 | 5041 | Transfer in from: | PZ | Penzance | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 04/12/1940 | 5060 | Transfer in from: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 01/1941 | 5078 | Transfer out to: | PZ | Penzance | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 03/01/1941 | 4087 | Transfer in from: | TR | Truro | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 09/01/1941 | 4080 | Transfer in from: | LDR | Landore | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 03/1941 | 4077 | Transfer out to: | PZ | Penzance | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 11/03/1941 | 5011 | Transfer out to: | PZ | Penzance | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 01/07/1941 | 5078 | Transfer in from: | PZ | Penzance | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 14/07/1941 | 5003 | Transfer in from: | EXE | Exeter | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 18/09/1941 | 5003 | Transfer out to: | EXE | Exeter | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 10/1941 | 5078 | Transfer out to: | TN | Taunton | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 23/12/1941 | 4080 | Transfer out to: | LDR | Landore | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 11/1942 | 5050 | Transfer in from: | EXE | Exeter | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 05/1943 | 4032 | Transfer out to: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 05/1943 | 5024 | Transfer out to: | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 06/1943 | 4093 | Transfer out to: | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 04/06/1943 | 5094 | Transfer in from: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 09/1943 | 5047 | Transfer in from: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 06/09/1943 | 4032 | Transfer in from: | EXE | Exeter | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 19/11/1943 | 5009 | Transfer out to: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 27/11/1943 | 5047 | Transfer out to: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 10/12/1943 | 5009 | Transfer in from: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 09/02/1944 | 5094 | Transfer out to: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 08/06/1944 | 4032 | Transfer out to: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 18/07/1944 | 4032 | Transfer in from: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | m/e | 12/1944 | 2922 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 24/05/1945 | 4097 | Transfer in from: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 26/01/1946 | 6419 | Transfer in from: | TN | Taunton | ||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 26/01/1946 | 4545 | Transfer out to: | PZ | Penzance | ||
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 23/03/1946 | 1006 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 8w/e | 23/03/1946 | 4133 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8w/e | 23/03/1946 | 4653 | Transfer in from: | TN | Taunton | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8w/e | 23/03/1946 | 4658 | Transfer in from: | TN | Taunton | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 8w/e | 23/03/1946 | 5567 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 23/03/1946 | 6002 | Transfer in from: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8w/e | 26/03/1946 | 8434 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 20/04/1946 | 4133 | Transfer out to: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 07/09/1946 | 4524 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 08/10/1946 | 4032 | Transfer out to: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 11/1946 | 4032 | Transfer in from: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 11/1946 | 4077 | Transfer in from: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | 1854 | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 12/1946 | 1761 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 17/12/1946 | 4097 | Transfer out to: | PZ | Penzance | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 01/1947 | 4077 | Transfer out to: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 03/1947 | 5079 | Transfer in from: | SDN | Swindon | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 25/04/1947 | 4098 | Transfer out to: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 17/05/1947 | 5026 | Transfer in from: | EXE | Exeter | ||
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 1004 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 1006 | Snapshot | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 1006 | Snapshot | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 1009 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 1361 | 0-6-0ST | on | 15/06/1947 | 1361 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 1361 | 0-6-0ST | on | 15/06/1947 | 1362 | Snapshot | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | 1361 | 0-6-0ST | on | 15/06/1947 | 1363 | Snapshot | la | Plymouth Dock | ||
Steam | 1361 | 0-6-0ST | on | 15/06/1947 | 1364 | Snapshot | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | 1361 | 0-6-0ST | on | 15/06/1947 | 1365 | Snapshot | la | Plymouth Dock | ||
Steam | 1854 | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 1799 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 1901 | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 1973 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 1901 | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 1990 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 2721 | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 2776 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 2809 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 2835 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 2857 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 2867 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3150 | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 3186 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3150 | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 3187 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 3391 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 3401 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 3431 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Bird | 4-4-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 3441 | Snapshot | TN | Taunton | ||
Steam | Bird | 4-4-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 3445 | Snapshot | WLN | Wellington | ||
Steam | Bird | 4-4-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 3446 | Snapshot | WES | Westbury | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 3629 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 3639 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 3675 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 3686 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 3705 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 3787 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 3790 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 3811 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 3818 | Snapshot | STJ | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 3864 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 3901 | Snapshot | OXY | Oxley | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 3904 | Snapshot | LDR | Landore | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 3955 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 4032 | Snapshot | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 4032 | Snapshot | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 4087 | Snapshot | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 4087 | Snapshot | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 4088 | Snapshot | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 4088 | Snapshot | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 4090 | Snapshot | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 4090 | Snapshot | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | 44xx | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 4402 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 44xx | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 4407 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 4517 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 4524 | Snapshot | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 4524 | Snapshot | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 4526 | Snapshot | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 4528 | Snapshot | pz | St Ives | ||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 4531 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 4542 | Snapshot | sbz | Bodmin | ||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 4565 | Snapshot | SBZ | St Blazey | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 4583 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 4591 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 4653 | Snapshot | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 4653 | Snapshot | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 4656 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 4658 | Snapshot | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 4658 | Snapshot | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 4679 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 4693 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 47xx | 2-8-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 4703 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 4807 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 4852 | Snapshot | STJ | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 4908 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 4937 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 4954 | Snapshot | TN | Taunton | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 4966 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 4969 | Snapshot | SPM | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 4982 | Snapshot | LDR | Landore | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 4991 | Snapshot | TR | Truro | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5009 | Snapshot | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5009 | Snapshot | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5026 | Snapshot | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5026 | Snapshot | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5041 | Snapshot | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5041 | Snapshot | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5050 | Snapshot | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5050 | Snapshot | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5057 | Snapshot | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5057 | Snapshot | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5060 | Snapshot | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5060 | Snapshot | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5079 | Snapshot | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5079 | Snapshot | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5090 | Snapshot | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5090 | Snapshot | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5095 | Snapshot | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5095 | Snapshot | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | 3100/5100 | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 5148 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5318 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5376 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5381 | Snapshot | DID | Didcot | ||
Steam | 54xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 5412 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 5540 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 5567 | Snapshot | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 5567 | Snapshot | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 5569 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5902 | Snapshot | TN | Taunton | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5998 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 6000 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 6002 | Snapshot | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 6002 | Snapshot | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 6004 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 6010 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 6012 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 6016 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 6017 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 6019 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 6020 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 6022 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 6026 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 6029 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 6319 | Snapshot | NEY | Neyland | ||
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 6406 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 6414 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 6417 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 6419 | Snapshot | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 6419 | Snapshot | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 6421 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 6907 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 6913 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 77161 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 77196 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 77294 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 7762 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 78671 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 78717 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 8427 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 8709 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 8719 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 9711 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 9716 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 9765 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 9770 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 11/1947 | 5079 | Transfer out to: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8427 | Snapshot | 4B | Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8434 | Snapshot | 19C | Canklow | ||
Steam | 3901 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 24/01/1948 | 3902 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/02/1948 | 5391 | Transfer in from: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 16/03/1948 | 5047 | Transfer in from: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | m/e | 31/03/1948 | 5391 | Transfer out to: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | 2721 | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 04/1948 | 2776 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 27/04/1948 | 5047 | Transfer out to: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | m/e | 05/1948 | 3391 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | m/e | 31/05/1948 | 7801 | Transfer in from: | SPM | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | m/e | 31/05/1948 | 7804 | Transfer in from: | SPM | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | m/e | 31/05/1948 | 7814 | Transfer in from: | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 29/06/1948 | 5021 | Transfer in from: | SALOP | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | m/e | 30/06/1948 | 7809 | Transfer in from: | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | 54xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 30/06/1948 | 5412 | Transfer out to: | SBZ | St Blazey | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 07/1948 | 4089 | Transfer in from: | WEY | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 07/1948 | 5041 | Transfer out to: | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/07/1948 | 4089 | Transfer in from: | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 10/07/1948 | 4569 | Transfer in from: | TR | Truro | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/07/1948 | 5021 | Transfer in from: | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | 54xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 10/07/1948 | 5412 | Transfer in from: | SBZ | St Blazey | ||
Steam | 1854 | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 10/07/1948 | 1799 | Transfer out to: | TR | Truro | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/07/1948 | 4089 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/07/1948 | 5021 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 10/07/1948 | 8709 | Transfer out to: | LLY | Llanelli | ||
Steam | 44xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 07/08/1948 | 4410 | Transfer in from: | EXE | Exeter | ||
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/08/1948 | 6025 | Transfer in from: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 07/08/1948 | 3811 | Transfer out to: | STJ | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/08/1948 | 5050 | Transfer out to: | SALOP | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/08/1948 | 6017 | Transfer out to: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 1361 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 04/09/1948 | 1361 | Transfer out to: | TN | Taunton | ||
Steam | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 04/09/1948 | 3401 | Transfer out to: | HFD | Hereford | ||
Steam | Bird | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 04/09/1948 | 3445 | Transfer out to: | GLO | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | Bird | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 04/09/1948 | 3446 | Transfer out to: | WOS | Worcester | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/09/1948 | 4908 | Transfer out to: | LDR | Landore | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 10/1948 | 5009 | Transfer out to: | SDN | Swindon | ||
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 14/10/1948 | 6420 | Transfer in from: | TN | Taunton | ||
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/10/1948 | 1022 | Transfer in from: | PZ | Penzance | ||
Steam | 1361 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 30/10/1948 | 1361 | Transfer in from: | TN | Taunton | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 30/10/1948 | 77378 | Transfer in from: | RDG | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/10/1948 | 1009 | Transfer out to: | NEY | Neyland | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 30/10/1948 | 2809 | Transfer out to: | TN | Taunton | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/10/1948 | 4937 | Transfer out to: | LDR | Landore | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/10/1948 | 4972 | Transfer out to: | SDN | Swindon | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 27/11/1948 | 2856 | Transfer in from: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 27/11/1948 | 2875 | Transfer in from: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 27/11/1948 | 3832 | Transfer in from: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 44xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 27/11/1948 | 4410 | Transfer out to: | EXE | Exeter | ||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 27/11/1948 | 4569 | Transfer out to: | SBZ | St Blazey | ||
Steam | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | m/e | 12/1948 | 3431 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3150 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 25/12/1948 | 3178 | Transfer in from: | STJ | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/12/1948 | 6023 | Transfer in from: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/12/1948 | 6024 | Transfer in from: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/12/1948 | 6027 | Transfer in from: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/12/1948 | 6000 | Transfer out to: | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/12/1948 | 6002 | Transfer out to: | SRD | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/12/1948 | 6004 | Transfer out to: | SRD | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/12/1948 | 6019 | Transfer out to: | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/12/1948 | 6020 | Transfer out to: | SRD | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/01/1949 | 1013 | Transfer in from: | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 29/01/1949 | 6407 | Transfer in from: | SHL | Southall | ||
Steam | Bird | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 29/01/1949 | 3441 | Transfer out to: | WOS | Worcester | ||
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 29/01/1949 | 6419 | Transfer out to: | TN | Taunton | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 02/1949 | 4088 | Transfer out to: | PZ | Penzance | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 11/03/1949 | 5098 | Transfer in from: | PZ | Penzance | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 12/05/1949 | 4032 | Transfer out to: | PZ | Penzance | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/05/1949 | 5098 | Transfer in from: | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/05/1949 | 4971 | Transfer out to: | TN | Taunton | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/05/1949 | 5060 | Transfer out to: | PZ | Penzance | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/05/1949 | 5098 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 25/05/1949 | 4088 | Transfer in from: | PZ | Penzance | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 30/05/1949 | 5098 | Transfer out to: | SDN | Swindon | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 06/1949 | 4080 | Transfer in from: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/06/1949 | 4080 | Transfer in from: | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/06/1949 | 4088 | Transfer in from: | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/06/1949 | 4080 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/06/1949 | 4088 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 01/07/1949 | 5098 | Transfer in from: | SDN | Swindon | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 13/08/1949 | 5060 | Transfer in from: | PZ | Penzance | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 13/08/1949 | 2848 | Transfer out to: | BAN | Banbury | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 13/08/1949 | 4966 | Transfer out to: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1949 | 7027 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 08/10/1949 | 5026 | Transfer out to: | PZ | Penzance | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 11/1949 | 7027 | Transfer in from: | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 11/1949 | 7027 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | 1901 | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 11/1949 | 1990 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 02/11/1949 | 4032 | Transfer in from: | PZ | Penzance | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/11/1949 | 4966 | Transfer in from: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 05/11/1949 | 6419 | Transfer in from: | TN | Taunton | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 05/11/1949 | 8404 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 12/1949 | 5026 | Transfer in from: | PZ | Penzance | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 12/1949 | 4087 | Transfer out to: | PZ | Penzance | ||
Steam | 1901 | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 12/1949 | 1973 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 44xx | 2-6-2T | m/e | 12/1949 | 4402 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/12/1949 | 4032 | Transfer in from: | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/12/1949 | 4968 | Transfer in from: | SPM | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/12/1949 | 5964 | Transfer in from: | SPM | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/12/1949 | 5969 | Transfer in from: | SPM | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/12/1949 | 4032 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | 54xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 03/12/1949 | 5412 | Transfer out to: | TN | Taunton | ||
Steam | 44xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 31/12/1949 | 4409 | Transfer in from: | WLN | Wellington | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1949 | 4965 | Transfer in from: | SPM | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1949 | 4992 | Transfer in from: | SPM | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1949 | 2856 | Transfer out to: | STB | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1949 | 2857 | Transfer out to: | STB | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1949 | 2867 | Transfer out to: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 28/01/1950 | 2148 | Transfer in from: | PZ | Penzance | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/01/1950 | 5026 | Transfer in from: | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/01/1950 | 5026 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 02/1950 | 4090 | Transfer out to: | PZ | Penzance | ||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | m/e | 02/1950 | 4531 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 03/1950 | 4097 | Transfer in from: | EXE | Exeter | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 03/1950 | 5012 | Transfer in from: | EXE | Exeter | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 03/1950 | 5058 | Transfer in from: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Star | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/03/1950 | 4054 | Transfer in from: | EXE | Exeter | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/03/1950 | 4097 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/03/1950 | 5012 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/03/1950 | 5058 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/03/1950 | 6855 | Transfer in from: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/03/1950 | 6873 | Transfer in from: | OXY | Oxley | ||
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/03/1950 | 1004 | Transfer out to: | 83F | Truro | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/03/1950 | 4097 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/03/1950 | 5012 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/03/1950 | 5058 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/04/1950 | 4087 | Transfer in from: | PZ | Penzance | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/05/1950 | 4087 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/05/1950 | 7909 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/05/1950 | 4087 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/05/1950 | 4965 | Transfer out to: | 83G | Penzance | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/05/1950 | 5969 | Transfer out to: | 83G | Penzance | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 24/05/1950 | 111 | Transfer in from: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 3w/e | 31/05/1950 | 6949 | Transfer out to: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 02/06/1950 | 4080 | Transfer out to: | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 10/06/1950 | 90642 | Transfer out to: | 25B | Huddersfield Hillhouse | ||
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/06/1950 | 1013 | Transfer out to: | 83F | Truro | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 17/06/1950 | 3629 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 27/06/1950 | 4032 | Transfer out to: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 07/07/1950 | 5023 | Reinstated | ||||
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 15/07/1950 | 1023 | Transfer in from: | 83F | Truro | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 15/07/1950 | 111 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 15/07/1950 | 3629 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 15/07/1950 | 4518 | Transfer in from: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 15/07/1950 | 5023 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 15/07/1950 | 7031 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 15/07/1950 | 111 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 15/07/1950 | 5023 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/08/1950 | 2258 | Transfer in from: | SPM | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/08/1950 | 2258 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/08/1950 | 2258 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 2258 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 5531 | Transfer in from: | SBZ | St Blazey | ||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 4517 | Transfer out to: | 83E | St Blazey | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 8404 | Transfer out to: | 83F | Truro | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 07/11/1950 | 5026 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 30/11/1950 | 5531 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 30/11/1950 | 5531 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | m/e | 12/1950 | 4528 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 4968 | Transfer out to: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 90359 | Transfer out to: | 26B | Agecroft | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | w/e | 31/12/1950 | 9433 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 3150 | 2-6-2T | m/e | 01/1951 | 3178 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 06/01/1951 | 77196 | Transfer out to: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 13/01/1951 | 5060 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 1000 | Transfer in from: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 1003 | Transfer in from: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 1010 | Transfer in from: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 1012 | Transfer in from: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 1015 | Transfer in from: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 1021 | Transfer in from: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 4900 | Transfer in from: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 4954 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 5968 | Transfer in from: | WEY | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 5993 | Transfer in from: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 6912 | Transfer in from: | WEY | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 6940 | Transfer in from: | GLO | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 6965 | Transfer in from: | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 6966 | Transfer in from: | WES | Westbury | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 6967 | Transfer in from: | OXY | Oxley | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 31/01/1951 | 9433 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 1022 | Transfer out to: | 83G | Penzance | ||
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 1023 | Transfer out to: | 83G | Penzance | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 4089 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 4097 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 5057 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 5095 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 7027 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 31/01/1951 | 9433 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | 44xx | 2-6-2T | m/e | 02/1951 | 4409 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/02/1951 | 1000 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/02/1951 | 1003 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/02/1951 | 1010 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/02/1951 | 1012 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/02/1951 | 1015 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/02/1951 | 1021 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 1024 | Transfer in from: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/02/1951 | 4954 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/02/1951 | 5968 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 5972 | Transfer in from: | CARM | Carmarthen | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/02/1951 | 5993 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/02/1951 | 6912 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/02/1951 | 6940 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/02/1951 | 6965 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/02/1951 | 6966 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/02/1951 | 6967 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 8425 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/02/1951 | 1000 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/02/1951 | 1003 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/02/1951 | 1010 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/02/1951 | 1012 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/02/1951 | 1015 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/02/1951 | 1021 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 2875 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 3832 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 3864 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/02/1951 | 4954 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/02/1951 | 5968 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/02/1951 | 5993 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/02/1951 | 6912 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/02/1951 | 6940 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/02/1951 | 6965 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/02/1951 | 6966 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/02/1951 | 6967 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/03/1951 | 1024 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/03/1951 | 5972 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 31/03/1951 | 8425 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/03/1951 | 1024 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/03/1951 | 4954 | Transfer out to: | 83C | Exeter | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/03/1951 | 5972 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 31/03/1951 | 8425 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 2843 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 4133 | Transfer in from: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 1003 | Transfer out to: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 4900 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 5540 | Transfer out to: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 30/04/1951 | 4530 | Transfer in from: | 83B | Taunton | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/04/1951 | 6912 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 30/04/1951 | 8422 | Transfer in from: | 83E | St Blazey | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 30/04/1951 | 8426 | Transfer in from: | 83E | St Blazey | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 30/04/1951 | 3705 | Transfer out to: | 83E | St Blazey | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/04/1951 | 6912 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 2843 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 4133 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | 44xx | 2-6-2T | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 4403 | Transfer in from: | WLN | Wellington | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 4590 | Transfer in from: | SDN | Swindon | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 2843 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 4133 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | on | 03/08/1951 | 70021 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 70021 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 4133 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 5318 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 70021 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 70019 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 70022 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 30/09/1951 | 70019 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 30/09/1951 | 70022 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 30/09/1951 | 70019 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 30/09/1951 | 70022 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 16/10/1951 | 5076 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | m/e | 31/10/1951 | 70021 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 31/10/1951 | 5968 | Transfer out to: | 84K | Chester West | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 31/10/1951 | 5972 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 31/10/1951 | 5993 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 31/10/1951 | 6940 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 31/10/1951 | 6966 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 31/10/1951 | 6967 | Transfer out to: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | m/e | 31/10/1951 | 70021 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 29/11/1951 | 5076 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 2088 | Transfer in from: | EXE | Exeter | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 4089 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 5057 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 5926 | Transfer in from: | SBZ | St Blazey | ||
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 6017 | Transfer in from: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 70022 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 70024 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 70022 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 02/1952 | 4089 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 02/1952 | 4089 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 02/1952 | 5057 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 02/1952 | 2148 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Star | 4-6-0 | m/e | 02/1952 | 4054 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 29/02/1952 | 9467 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 29/02/1952 | 2038 | Transfer in from: | TN | Taunton | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/02/1952 | 5926 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/02/1952 | 6017 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 29/02/1952 | 70022 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 29/02/1952 | 70024 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/02/1952 | 5926 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/02/1952 | 6017 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 29/02/1952 | 70022 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 29/02/1952 | 70024 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 9467 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 5376 | Transfer out to: | 83F | Truro | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 70022 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 9467 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 2835 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 23/04/1952 | 4087 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 23/04/1952 | 4087 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 30/04/1952 | 5057 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 30/04/1952 | 9467 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 30/04/1952 | 9467 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 6373 | Transfer in from: | TR | Truro | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 4999 | Transfer in from: | 83G | Penzance | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6w/e | 30/06/1952 | 4999 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6w/e | 30/06/1952 | 4999 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 2w/e | 12/07/1952 | 5997 | Transfer in from: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | 2w/e | 12/07/1952 | 6008 | Transfer in from: | SRD | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 2w/e | 12/07/1952 | 6940 | Transfer in from: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 2w/e | 12/07/1952 | 4999 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | 2w/e | 12/07/1952 | 6016 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 2w/e | 12/07/1952 | 90148 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 5356 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 7815 | Transfer in from: | GLO | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 7824 | Transfer in from: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 4991 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 6373 | Transfer out to: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 7w/e | 31/08/1952 | 5356 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 7w/e | 31/08/1952 | 7815 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 7w/e | 31/08/1952 | 7824 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 7w/e | 31/08/1952 | 5356 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 7w/e | 31/08/1952 | 7815 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 7w/e | 31/08/1952 | 7824 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 10/1952 | 4087 | Transfer out to: | 83G | Penzance | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 10/1952 | 5021 | Transfer out to: | 83C | Exeter | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 10/1952 | 5023 | Transfer out to: | 83G | Penzance | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 10/1952 | 5090 | Transfer out to: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | m/e | 10/1952 | 4518 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 1026 | Transfer in from: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 1024 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 2088 | Transfer out to: | 83B | Taunton | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 11/1952 | 5012 | Transfer out to: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 1016 | Transfer in from: | SRD | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 4534 | Transfer in from: | HFD | Hereford | ||
Steam | 47xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 4706 | Transfer in from: | SPM | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 5175 | Transfer in from: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 5376 | Transfer in from: | 83F | Truro | ||
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 6014 | Transfer in from: | 84A | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 6821 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 6838 | Transfer in from: | PZ | Penzance | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 6869 | Transfer in from: | PZ | Penzance | ||
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 1000 | Transfer out to: | 84K | Chester West | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 5926 | Transfer out to: | 83E | St Blazey | ||
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 1016 | Transfer out to: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 44xx | 2-6-2T | m/e | 01/1953 | 4403 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 09/02/1953 | 4086 | Transfer in from: | 87G | Carmarthen | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 4978 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 6802 | Transfer in from: | RDG | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 1010 | Transfer out to: | 83F | Truro | ||
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 1026 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 03/1953 | 2038 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 44xx | 2-6-2T | m/e | 03/1953 | 4407 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 04/03/1953 | 5010 | Transfer in from: | 84A | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 1002 | Transfer in from: | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | 44xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 4410 | Transfer in from: | EXE | Exeter | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 9765 | Transfer out to: | 83C | Exeter | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 14/05/1953 | 5010 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 1010 | Transfer in from: | 83F | Truro | ||
Steam | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 1624 | Transfer in from: | 89C | Machynlleth | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 4950 | Transfer in from: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 6816 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 1002 | Transfer out to: | 83G | Penzance | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 5998 | Transfer out to: | 83G | Penzance | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 5913 | Transfer in from: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 6389 | Transfer in from: | NEY | Neyland | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 6860 | Transfer in from: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 6933 | Transfer in from: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 11/07/1953 | 7001 | Transfer in from: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 5356 | Transfer out to: | 82D | Westbury | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 13/07/1953 | 7001 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 13/07/1953 | 111 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/08/1953 | 5356 | Transfer in from: | 82D | Westbury | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 08/08/1953 | 70016 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | 47xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 08/08/1953 | 4703 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 44xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 05/09/1953 | 4401 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/09/1953 | 6389 | Transfer out to: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 2097 | Transfer in from: | 83E | St Blazey | ||
Steam | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 1624 | Transfer out to: | 83E | St Blazey | ||
Steam | 47xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 4706 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 5997 | Transfer out to: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 6860 | Transfer out to: | 86G | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 7801 | Transfer out to: | 84K | Chester West | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 28/10/1953 | 4088 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | 44xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 4401 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 6417 | Transfer out to: | 86J | Aberdare | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/11/1953 | 5998 | Transfer in from: | 83G | Penzance | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 26/12/1953 | 3862 | Transfer in from: | OXF | Oxford | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/12/1953 | 4963 | Transfer in from: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/12/1953 | 5961 | Transfer in from: | WES | Westbury | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/12/1953 | 6978 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 1361 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 26/12/1953 | 1361 | Transfer out to: | 83B | Taunton | ||
Steam | 1361 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 30/01/1954 | 1361 | Transfer in from: | 83B | Taunton | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/01/1954 | 6988 | Transfer in from: | WEY | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/02/1954 | 5934 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/03/1954 | 6004 | Transfer in from: | SRD | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/03/1954 | 6014 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 06/1954 | 4089 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 08/06/1954 | 5057 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/06/1954 | 75028 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/06/1954 | 75029 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/06/1954 | 1006 | Transfer out to: | 87G | Carmarthen | ||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/06/1954 | 7804 | Transfer out to: | 87G | Carmarthen | ||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/06/1954 | 7814 | Transfer out to: | 83F | Truro | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 23/06/1954 | 5069 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 6012 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 7809 | Transfer out to: | 83B | Taunton | ||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 7815 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 7824 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 08/1954 | 4087 | Transfer in from: | 83G | Penzance | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 08/1954 | 5023 | Transfer in from: | 83G | Penzance | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 09/1954 | 4088 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 11/09/1954 | 4077 | Transfer in from: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 1018 | Transfer in from: | 84A | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 7814 | Transfer in from: | 83F | Truro | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 4963 | Transfer out to: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 4966 | Transfer out to: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 5913 | Transfer out to: | 87F | Llanelli | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 5961 | Transfer out to: | 87F | Llanelli | ||
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 6024 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 75029 | Transfer out to: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 11/10/1954 | 5016 | Transfer in from: | LDR | Landore | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 4167 | Transfer in from: | 83E | St Blazey | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 4936 | Transfer in from: | TR | Truro | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 5193 | Transfer in from: | 83E | St Blazey | ||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 7809 | Transfer in from: | 83B | Taunton | ||
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 1018 | Transfer out to: | 83G | Penzance | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 5531 | Transfer out to: | 83E | St Blazey | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 6933 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 6988 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 30/11/1954 | 1650 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 12/1954 | 5016 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Steam | 44xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 4406 | Transfer in from: | 86F | Tondu | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 5531 | Transfer in from: | 83E | St Blazey | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 4167 | Transfer out to: | 83E | St Blazey | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/01/1955 | 4965 | Transfer in from: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/01/1955 | 5909 | Transfer in from: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/01/1955 | 7815 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/01/1955 | 7820 | Transfer in from: | 84K | Chester West | ||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/01/1955 | 7824 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 82031 | Transfer in from: | 88C | Barry | ||
Steam | 44xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 4406 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | m/e | 02/1955 | 4534 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 03/1955 | 2097 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | m/e | 03/1955 | 4530 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 8w/e | 26/03/1955 | 5552 | Transfer in from: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 26/03/1955 | 1021 | Transfer out to: | 83G | Penzance | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 8w/e | 26/03/1955 | 82031 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 23/04/1955 | 5557 | Transfer in from: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | 1361 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 23/04/1955 | 1365 | Transfer out to: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4w/e | 21/05/1955 | 1408 | Transfer in from: | WOS | Worcester | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4w/e | 21/05/1955 | 1434 | Transfer in from: | 89C | Machynlleth | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/05/1955 | 6925 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/05/1955 | 6988 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/07/1955 | 1021 | Transfer in from: | 83G | Penzance | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 16/07/1955 | 5558 | Transfer in from: | 83B | Taunton | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/07/1955 | 5952 | Transfer in from: | 83G | Penzance | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/07/1955 | 6934 | Transfer in from: | 83G | Penzance | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 16/07/1955 | 5552 | Transfer out to: | 83F | Truro | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 16/07/1955 | 5557 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 16/07/1955 | 6407 | Transfer out to: | 83C | Exeter | ||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 13/08/1955 | 7814 | Transfer out to: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | 44xx | 2-6-2T | m/e | 09/1955 | 4410 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | m/e | 09/1955 | 4542 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 10/09/1955 | 5558 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 4568 | Transfer in from: | SBZ | St Blazey | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 4592 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 5506 | Transfer in from: | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 5551 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 6407 | Transfer in from: | 83C | Exeter | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 4965 | Transfer out to: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 5909 | Transfer out to: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 5952 | Transfer out to: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 5998 | Transfer out to: | 85C | Hereford | ||
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 6022 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 6907 | Transfer out to: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 6912 | Transfer out to: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 6925 | Transfer out to: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 6934 | Transfer out to: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 7815 | Transfer out to: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 7824 | Transfer out to: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/11/1955 | 1023 | Transfer in from: | 83F | Truro | ||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 05/11/1955 | 4524 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 1023 | Transfer out to: | 83F | Truro | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 90266 | Transfer out to: | 24A | Accrington | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1955 | 6834 | Transfer in from: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1955 | 6843 | Transfer in from: | 87G | Carmarthen | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1955 | 6858 | Transfer in from: | 87F | Llanelli | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1955 | 6865 | Transfer in from: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/01/1956 | 6848 | Transfer in from: | 83B | Taunton | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/01/1956 | 6843 | Transfer out to: | 87F | Llanelli | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 04/1956 | 5089 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 06/1956 | 5028 | Transfer in from: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 4174 | Transfer in from: | CHEL | Cheltenham Malvern Road | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 4900 | Transfer in from: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 4976 | Transfer in from: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 4977 | Transfer in from: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 5350 | Transfer in from: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 5943 | Transfer in from: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 5945 | Transfer in from: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 5954 | Transfer in from: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 6301 | Transfer in from: | 83B | Taunton | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 6328 | Transfer in from: | TN | Taunton | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 6921 | Transfer in from: | GLO | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 6941 | Transfer in from: | CHR | Chester West | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 7321 | Transfer in from: | SDN | Swindon | ||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 4568 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 4978 | Transfer out to: | 83B | Taunton | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 5964 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 6023 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 75028 | Transfer out to: | 89A | Oswestry | ||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 7809 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/07/1956 | 7809 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 14/07/1956 | 4174 | Transfer out to: | 83C | Exeter | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 5558 | Transfer in from: | 87G | Carmarthen | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 6838 | Transfer out to: | 87H | Neyland | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1956 | 5350 | Transfer out to: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 08/09/1956 | 5558 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1956 | 7321 | Transfer out to: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 6021 | Transfer in from: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 1012 | Transfer out to: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 4900 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 4977 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 5945 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 5954 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 6834 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 6865 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 6869 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1956 | 5943 | Transfer out to: | 81E | Didcot | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 12/1956 | 5049 | Transfer in from: | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/12/1956 | 5336 | Transfer in from: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/12/1956 | 7812 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/12/1956 | 7824 | Transfer in from: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 29/12/1956 | 70016 | Transfer out to: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 29/12/1956 | 70019 | Transfer out to: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 29/12/1956 | 70024 | Transfer out to: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 24/01/1957 | 5072 | Transfer in from: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 47xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 26/01/1957 | 4705 | Transfer in from: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 26/01/1957 | 5020 | Transfer in from: | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/01/1957 | 6978 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 26/01/1957 | 70021 | Transfer out to: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/01/1957 | 7824 | Transfer out to: | 83G | Penzance | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 31/01/1957 | 7031 | Transfer out to: | 83B | Taunton | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 09/02/1957 | 5003 | Transfer in from: | 83C | Exeter | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 03/1957 | 5021 | Transfer in from: | 83C | Exeter | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 20/04/1957 | 5020 | Transfer out to: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 29/05/1957 | 5058 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | 3150 | 2-6-2T | m/e | 06/1957 | 3186 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 01/06/1957 | 5058 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 13/07/1957 | 4924 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 13/07/1957 | 6849 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 13/07/1957 | 6856 | Transfer in from: | 83B | Taunton | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 4928 | Transfer in from: | 83B | Taunton | ||
Steam | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 7445 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 07/09/1957 | 7445 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/10/1957 | 4924 | Transfer out to: | 83F | Truro | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/10/1957 | 4928 | Transfer out to: | 83F | Truro | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/10/1957 | 4950 | Transfer out to: | 83G | Penzance | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/10/1957 | 6802 | Transfer out to: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/10/1957 | 6856 | Transfer out to: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/10/1957 | 7809 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | 3150 | 2-6-2T | m/e | 11/1957 | 3187 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 02/11/1957 | 5106 | Transfer in from: | 84A | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/11/1957 | 7333 | Transfer in from: | 83F | Truro | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/11/1957 | 4992 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/11/1957 | 5336 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/11/1957 | 5376 | Transfer out to: | 83F | Truro | ||
Steam | 1361 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 1362 | Transfer in from: | 83B | Taunton | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 30/11/1957 | 5020 | Transfer in from: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 5356 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 11/12/1957 | 5003 | Transfer out to: | 87G | Carmarthen | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 28/00/1958 | 4088 | Transfer out to: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | m/e | 01/1958 | 4583 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 23/01/1958 | 7022 | Transfer in from: | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 4944 | Transfer in from: | SHL | Southall | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 5336 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 5983 | Transfer in from: | SHL | Southall | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 6850 | Transfer in from: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 6867 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 6945 | Transfer in from: | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | ||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 7813 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | 1361 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 1362 | Transfer out to: | 83B | Taunton | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 27/01/1958 | 5023 | Transfer out to: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | 1361 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 22/02/1958 | 1362 | Transfer in from: | 83B | Taunton | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 22/02/1958 | 5572 | Transfer in from: | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 22/02/1958 | 5193 | Transfer out to: | 83E | St Blazey | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/02/1958 | 5934 | Transfer out to: | 83G | Penzance | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/02/1958 | 6328 | Transfer out to: | 86G | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/02/1958 | 6816 | Transfer out to: | 83G | Penzance | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 03/1958 | 7006 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | m/e | 03/1958 | 1408 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 20/03/1958 | 5072 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 6821 | Transfer out to: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 6848 | Transfer out to: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 6867 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 6965 | Transfer out to: | 83C | Exeter | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 04/1958 | 5075 | Transfer in from: | 84A | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | 1361 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 19/04/1958 | 1361 | Transfer out to: | 83B | Taunton | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | m/e | 05/1958 | 5506 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 02/05/1958 | D3509 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 02/05/1958 | D3510 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 09/05/1958 | D3511 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 09/05/1958 | D3512 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 16/05/1958 | D3513 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 16/05/1958 | D3514 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | D20/2 | A1A-A1A | 4w/e | 17/05/1958 | D600 | Transfer in from: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 20/05/1958 | 5089 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Stafford Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 23/05/1958 | D3515 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 23/05/1958 | D3516 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 23/05/1958 | D3517 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/05/1958 | D3518 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/06/1958 | 4928 | Transfer in from: | 83F | Truro | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/06/1958 | 6805 | Transfer in from: | 83F | Truro | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/06/1958 | 6848 | Transfer in from: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 12/06/1958 | 8719 | Transfer out to: | 83B | Taunton | ||
Steam | 1361 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 1361 | Transfer in from: | 83B | Taunton | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 1421 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | D3515 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Laira | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | D3516 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Laira | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | D3517 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 4975 | Transfer in from: | 85C | Hereford | ||
Diesel | D20/2 | A1A-A1A | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | D601 | Transfer in from: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 6823 | Transfer in from: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 6863 | Transfer in from: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 6871 | Transfer in from: | 83F | Truro | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 6879 | Transfer in from: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 7805 | Transfer in from: | 85C | Hereford | ||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 7815 | Transfer in from: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 9313 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | D3515 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Laira | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | D3516 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Laira | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | D3517 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 24/07/1958 | 5049 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 08/1958 | 6407 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/08/1958 | 1008 | Transfer in from: | 83G | Penzance | ||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 09/08/1958 | 4553 | Transfer in from: | 83C | Exeter | ||
Steam | 1361 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 09/08/1958 | 1362 | Transfer out to: | 83B | Taunton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | D3520 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | D3522 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | D3523 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | D3524 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | D3525 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | D3526 | Transfer in from: | 83F | Truro | ||
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 6402 | Transfer in from: | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | D3510 | Transfer out to: | 83F | Truro | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | D3511 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | D3512 | Transfer out to: | 83C | Exeter | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | D3513 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | D3514 | Transfer out to: | 83G | Penzance | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | D3515 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | D3517 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | D3518 | Transfer out to: | 83C | Exeter | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 5983 | Transfer out to: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | m/e | 10/1958 | 4590 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 2809 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | D800 | Transfer in from: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 3629 | Transfer out to: | 82D | Westbury | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 5336 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 5551 | Transfer out to: | 83E | St Blazey | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 6848 | Transfer out to: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 6858 | Transfer out to: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 6945 | Transfer out to: | 82D | Westbury | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 7762 | Transfer out to: | 6E | Chester West | ||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 7805 | Transfer out to: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 7815 | Transfer out to: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 7909 | Transfer out to: | 82D | Westbury | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 01/11/1958 | 5511 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1958 | D3522 | Transfer out to: | 83C | Exeter | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 01/11/1958 | 3639 | Transfer out to: | 87H | Neyland | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 01/11/1958 | 4653 | Transfer out to: | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 01/11/1958 | 4693 | Transfer out to: | 84K | Wrexham Rhosddu | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1958 | 4944 | Transfer out to: | 83C | Exeter | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1958 | 4976 | Transfer out to: | 83G | Penzance | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1958 | 6805 | Transfer out to: | 83F | Truro | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1958 | 6823 | Transfer out to: | 83F | Truro | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 01/11/1958 | 8425 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 01/11/1958 | 8426 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Stafford Road | ||
Diesel | D20/2 | A1A-A1A | on | 03/11/1958 | D602 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | on | 07/11/1958 | D801 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | D20/2 | A1A-A1A | on | 21/11/1958 | D603 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/11/1958 | 5972 | Transfer in from: | 83G | Penzance | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/11/1958 | 6855 | Transfer out to: | 83F | Truro | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/11/1958 | 6940 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | m/e | 12/1958 | 4553 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | on | 16/12/1958 | D802 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/12/1958 | 4936 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/12/1958 | 4975 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 27/12/1958 | 5020 | Transfer out to: | 83G | Penzance | ||
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/12/1958 | 6027 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/12/1958 | 6871 | Transfer out to: | 83G | Penzance | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/12/1958 | 6873 | Transfer out to: | 83G | Penzance | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/12/1958 | 6879 | Transfer out to: | 83F | Truro | ||
Diesel | D20/2 | A1A-A1A | on | 20/01/1959 | D604 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/01/1959 | 6016 | Transfer in from: | 84A | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/01/1959 | 6027 | Transfer in from: | 84A | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/01/1959 | 6871 | Transfer in from: | 83G | Penzance | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/01/1959 | 6873 | Transfer in from: | 83G | Penzance | ||
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/01/1959 | 1008 | Transfer out to: | 83G | Penzance | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/01/1959 | D3509 | Transfer out to: | 83F | Truro | ||
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/01/1959 | 6008 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Stafford Road | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | on | 19/02/1959 | D6301 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | on | 19/02/1959 | D6302 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 21/02/1959 | 2899 | Transfer in from: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/02/1959 | 4571 | Transfer in from: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 4w/e | 21/02/1959 | D6300 | Transfer in from: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 21/02/1959 | 3818 | Transfer out to: | 86G | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 21/02/1959 | 4852 | Transfer out to: | 86G | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/02/1959 | 6017 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | w/e | 11/03/1959 | 4656 | Transfer out to: | 72C | Yeovil Town | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | w/e | 11/03/1959 | 9770 | Transfer out to: | 70A | Nine Elms | ||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | on | 16/03/1959 | D803 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/03/1959 | 6007 | Transfer in from: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/03/1959 | 6027 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/03/1959 | 6027 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 24/03/1959 | 7031 | Transfer in from: | 83B | Taunton | ||
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/04/1959 | 6013 | Transfer in from: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 18/04/1959 | 6400 | Transfer in from: | PPRD | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/04/1959 | 6933 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/04/1959 | 6010 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | on | 23/04/1959 | D804 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 05/05/1959 | 4077 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | on | 13/05/1959 | D805 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | on | 22/05/1959 | D6303 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | m/e | 06/1959 | 2843 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 06/1959 | 6402 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 06/1959 | 6414 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | on | 03/06/1959 | D806 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 13/06/1959 | 4571 | Transfer out to: | 83G | Penzance | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 18/06/1959 | 5075 | Transfer out to: | 83C | Exeter | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | on | 23/06/1959 | D6304 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | on | 24/06/1959 | D807 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | on | 30/06/1959 | 92208 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | on | 30/06/1959 | 92209 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | m/e | 07/1959 | 92209 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | m/e | 07/1959 | 92209 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Laira | ||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | on | 08/07/1959 | D808 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/07/1959 | 4904 | Transfer in from: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/07/1959 | 4913 | Transfer in from: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/07/1959 | 4950 | Transfer in from: | 83G | Penzance | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/07/1959 | 4976 | Transfer in from: | 83G | Penzance | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 11/07/1959 | 5519 | Transfer in from: | SBZ | St Blazey | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/07/1959 | 7921 | Transfer in from: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 11/07/1959 | 92221 | Transfer in from: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 11/07/1959 | 92222 | Transfer in from: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 11/07/1959 | 92223 | Transfer in from: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 11/07/1959 | 92224 | Transfer in from: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 11/07/1959 | 92225 | Transfer in from: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/07/1959 | 6025 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/07/1959 | 6029 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/07/1959 | 6849 | Transfer out to: | 83G | Penzance | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4w/e | 08/08/1959 | 1420 | Transfer in from: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/08/1959 | 5972 | Transfer out to: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | on | 19/08/1959 | D809 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 05/09/1959 | 6408 | Transfer in from: | 82D | Westbury | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 05/09/1959 | 92209 | Transfer out to: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | on | 16/09/1959 | D810 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 22/09/1959 | 5021 | Transfer out to: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 22/09/1959 | 5058 | Transfer out to: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 22/09/1959 | 7006 | Transfer out to: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 28/09/1959 | 4086 | Transfer out to: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 03/10/1959 | 6166 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 03/10/1959 | 6410 | Transfer in from: | ABDR | Aberdare | ||
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/10/1959 | 1010 | Transfer out to: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/10/1959 | 1015 | Transfer out to: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/10/1959 | 4913 | Transfer out to: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/10/1959 | 6004 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/10/1959 | 6007 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/10/1959 | 6021 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/10/1959 | 6988 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/10/1959 | 7812 | Transfer out to: | 83F | Truro | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | on | 12/10/1959 | D6306 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | on | 12/10/1959 | D6307 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | on | 14/10/1959 | D811 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 31/10/1959 | 6413 | Transfer in from: | 14D | Neasden | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/10/1959 | 4928 | Transfer out to: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/10/1959 | 6850 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 11/1959 | 6420 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 04/11/1959 | 5029 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 04/11/1959 | 5053 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | on | 12/11/1959 | D812 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | w/e | 14/11/1959 | 6413 | Transfer out to: | 91W | To Western Region / GWR | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/11/1959 | 4967 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 28/11/1959 | 5532 | Transfer in from: | 82D | Westbury | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/11/1959 | 6319 | Transfer in from: | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/11/1959 | 6938 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/11/1959 | 1021 | Transfer out to: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/11/1959 | 6027 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/11/1959 | 6319 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/11/1959 | 6871 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/11/1959 | 6933 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/11/1959 | 7813 | Transfer out to: | 83F | Truro | ||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/11/1959 | 7820 | Transfer out to: | 83F | Truro | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 30/11/1959 | 5058 | Transfer in from: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | 3100/5100 | 2-6-2T | m/e | 12/1959 | 5148 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | on | 09/12/1959 | D813 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 26/12/1959 | 4174 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/12/1959 | 4904 | Transfer out to: | 83B | Taunton | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/12/1959 | 6319 | Transfer out to: | 83C | Exeter | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | m/e | 01/1960 | 2809 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | m/e | 01/1960 | 4592 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | m/e | 01/1960 | 5567 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | on | 01/01/1960 | D814 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | on | 05/01/1960 | D6310 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 05/01/1960 | 7031 | Transfer out to: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | on | 07/01/1960 | D2128 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | on | 07/01/1960 | D6308 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | on | 07/01/1960 | D6311 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | on | 11/01/1960 | D6305 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | on | 12/01/1960 | D6309 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | on | 12/01/1960 | D6313 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | on | 14/01/1960 | D6312 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | on | 20/01/1960 | D815 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | on | 25/01/1960 | D6314 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | on | 25/01/1960 | D6315 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/01/1960 | D2127 | Transfer in from: | 87C | Danygraig | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 30/01/1960 | 5541 | Transfer in from: | MCH | Machynlleth | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 30/01/1960 | 4174 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | 1361 | 0-6-0ST | 6w/e | 09/02/1960 | 1361 | Transfer out to: | 71G | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | ||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | on | 17/02/1960 | D816 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 27/02/1960 | 4549 | Transfer in from: | MCH | Machynlleth | ||
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/02/1960 | 6002 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/02/1960 | 6854 | Transfer in from: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | 1361 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 27/02/1960 | 1364 | Transfer out to: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 27/02/1960 | 5541 | Transfer out to: | 83G | Penzance | ||
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/02/1960 | 6026 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | m/e | 03/1960 | 5106 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | on | 01/03/1960 | D6316 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | on | 01/03/1960 | D6317 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | on | 09/03/1960 | D817 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | on | 14/03/1960 | D6318 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | on | 23/03/1960 | D6320 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/03/1960 | 6013 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 26/03/1960 | 92208 | Transfer out to: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 26/03/1960 | 92221 | Transfer out to: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 26/03/1960 | 92222 | Transfer out to: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 26/03/1960 | 92223 | Transfer out to: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 26/03/1960 | 92225 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | on | 30/03/1960 | D818 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | on | 07/04/1960 | D6321 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | on | 07/04/1960 | D6322 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | on | 11/04/1960 | D6319 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | on | 25/04/1960 | D6323 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | on | 25/04/1960 | D819 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | on | 04/05/1960 | D820 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | on | 16/05/1960 | D6326 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 20/05/1960 | 5028 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 21/05/1960 | 2846 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 21/05/1960 | 2875 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/05/1960 | 6816 | Transfer in from: | 83G | Penzance | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/05/1960 | 6836 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/05/1960 | 6837 | Transfer in from: | 83G | Penzance | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/05/1960 | 7916 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/05/1960 | 6941 | Transfer out to: | 83B | Taunton | ||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | on | 25/05/1960 | D821 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | m/e | 06/1960 | 5519 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 06/1960 | 6406 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | on | 01/06/1960 | D6324 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | on | 14/06/1960 | D6325 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | on | 15/06/1960 | D822 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 16/06/1960 | 4095 | Transfer in from: | 83B | Taunton | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | on | 18/06/1960 | D6328 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | on | 18/06/1960 | D6329 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 1018 | Transfer in from: | 83G | Penzance | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 4589 | Transfer in from: | 83C | Exeter | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 6805 | Transfer in from: | 83G | Penzance | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 6845 | Transfer in from: | 83G | Penzance | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 6849 | Transfer in from: | 83G | Penzance | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 92221 | Transfer in from: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 92222 | Transfer in from: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 92223 | Transfer in from: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 92249 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 4549 | Transfer out to: | 83G | Penzance | ||
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 6408 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 7333 | Transfer out to: | 83B | Taunton | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | on | 30/06/1960 | D6327 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | on | 06/07/1960 | D823 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 43 | B-B | on | 06/07/1960 | D833 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4w/e | 16/07/1960 | 1421 | Transfer out to: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 16/07/1960 | 6410 | Transfer out to: | 81B | Slough | ||
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 16/07/1960 | 6419 | Transfer out to: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 16/07/1960 | 6421 | Transfer out to: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 16/07/1960 | 92224 | Transfer out to: | 81C | Southall | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | on | 26/07/1960 | D6330 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | on | 26/07/1960 | D6331 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 43 | B-B | on | 26/07/1960 | D834 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | on | 27/07/1960 | D824 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | on | 28/07/1960 | D6332 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | on | 03/08/1960 | D6333 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 43 | B-B | on | 05/08/1960 | D835 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 13/08/1960 | 1650 | Transfer out to: | 83C | Exeter | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 13/08/1960 | 2846 | Transfer out to: | 82D | Westbury | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 13/08/1960 | 2875 | Transfer out to: | 82D | Westbury | ||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | on | 24/08/1960 | D825 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | m/e | 09/1960 | 4589 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | on | 07/09/1960 | D826 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | 3790 | Transfer out to: | 83E | St Blazey | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | 6166 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | 92221 | Transfer out to: | 82D | Westbury | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | 92223 | Transfer out to: | 82D | Westbury | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | 9716 | Transfer out to: | 83E | St Blazey | ||
Diesel | 43 | B-B | on | 13/09/1960 | D836 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 43 | B-B | on | 03/10/1960 | D838 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | on | 04/10/1960 | D827 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 5541 | Transfer in from: | 83G | Penzance | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 5560 | Transfer in from: | 86F | Tondu | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 4950 | Transfer out to: | 81E | Didcot | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 4976 | Transfer out to: | 81E | Didcot | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 5572 | Transfer out to: | 83E | St Blazey | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 6805 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 6816 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 6837 | Transfer out to: | 87F | Llanelli | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 6845 | Transfer out to: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 6849 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 6854 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 6913 | Transfer out to: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 7921 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 92249 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | on | 19/10/1960 | D828 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/11/1960 | 1002 | Transfer in from: | 83E | St Blazey | ||
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/11/1960 | 1006 | Transfer in from: | 83E | St Blazey | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 05/11/1960 | 5193 | Transfer in from: | 83E | St Blazey | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 05/11/1960 | 5568 | Transfer in from: | 88C | Barry | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 05/11/1960 | 5175 | Transfer out to: | 83C | Exeter | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 05/11/1960 | 92222 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Diesel | 43 | B-B | on | 08/11/1960 | D837 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 43 | B-B | on | 12/11/1960 | D839 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | on | 23/11/1960 | D829 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | on | 01/12/1960 | D6334 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/12/1960 | 1002 | Transfer out to: | 83G | Penzance | ||
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/12/1960 | 1018 | Transfer out to: | 83G | Penzance | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 03/12/1960 | 5193 | Transfer out to: | 87H | Neyland | ||
Diesel | 43 | B-B | on | 14/12/1960 | D841 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 43 | B-B | on | 20/12/1960 | D842 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1960 | 1017 | Transfer in from: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 31/12/1960 | 5175 | Transfer in from: | 83C | Exeter | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1960 | 5917 | Transfer in from: | WOS | Worcester | ||
Diesel | 43 | B-B | on | 02/01/1961 | D843 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | on | 11/01/1961 | D831 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/01/1961 | 1003 | Transfer in from: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/01/1961 | 6340 | Transfer in from: | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/01/1961 | 1017 | Transfer out to: | 89A | Shrewsbury | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 4w/e | 28/01/1961 | D6326 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 4w/e | 28/01/1961 | D6327 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 4w/e | 28/01/1961 | D6328 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 4w/e | 28/01/1961 | D6329 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 4w/e | 28/01/1961 | D6330 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 4w/e | 28/01/1961 | D6331 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | 4w/e | 28/01/1961 | D825 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | 4w/e | 28/01/1961 | D826 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | 4w/e | 28/01/1961 | D827 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | 4w/e | 28/01/1961 | D828 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | 4w/e | 28/01/1961 | D829 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 28/01/1961 | 9433 | Transfer out to: | 83G | Penzance | ||
Diesel | 43 | B-B | on | 03/02/1961 | D840 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | on | 08/02/1961 | D832 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | on | 22/02/1961 | D6335 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/02/1961 | D4005 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/02/1961 | 6804 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/02/1961 | 7326 | Transfer in from: | 85C | Hereford | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 4w/e | 25/02/1961 | D6332 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 4w/e | 25/02/1961 | D6333 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | 4w/e | 25/02/1961 | D824 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 43 | B-B | on | 16/03/1961 | D844 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | on | 24/03/1961 | D866 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/03/1961 | D4005 | Transfer out to: | 83E | St Blazey | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/03/1961 | 4967 | Transfer out to: | 83C | Exeter | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/03/1961 | 7326 | Transfer out to: | 83B | Taunton | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | m/e | 04/1961 | 5175 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 43 | B-B | on | 07/04/1961 | D845 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 43 | B-B | on | 12/04/1961 | D846 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 43 | B-B | on | 22/04/1961 | D847 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 22/04/1961 | 5572 | Transfer in from: | 83E | St Blazey | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/04/1961 | 6340 | Transfer out to: | 83B | Taunton | ||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | on | 26/04/1961 | D867 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 43 | B-B | on | 27/04/1961 | D848 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 02/05/1961 | D4013 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | on | 18/05/1961 | D868 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/05/1961 | D4010 | Transfer in from: | 83E | St Blazey | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 20/05/1961 | 3675 | Transfer out to: | 82D | Westbury | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 20/05/1961 | 8422 | Transfer out to: | 81C | Southall | ||
Diesel | 43 | B-B | on | 29/05/1961 | D849 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 43 | B-B | on | 08/06/1961 | D850 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/06/1961 | 6815 | Transfer in from: | TN | Taunton | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/06/1961 | 6860 | Transfer in from: | 83B | Taunton | ||
Steam | 47xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 17/06/1961 | 4705 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Diesel | 43 | B-B | on | 10/07/1961 | D851 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | on | 12/07/1961 | D869 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 15/07/1961 | 4561 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 15/07/1961 | 5544 | Transfer in from: | 83F | Truro | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 4w/e | 15/07/1961 | D6334 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 4w/e | 15/07/1961 | D6335 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 43 | B-B | on | 24/07/1961 | D852 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 43 | B-B | m/e | 08/1961 | D836 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/08/1961 | D2129 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/08/1961 | D4013 | Transfer out to: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | 4w/e | 12/08/1961 | D831 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | 4w/e | 12/08/1961 | D832 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 43 | B-B | 4w/e | 12/08/1961 | D833 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 43 | B-B | 4w/e | 12/08/1961 | D834 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 12/08/1961 | 9711 | Transfer out to: | 88H | Tondu | ||
Diesel | 43 | B-B | on | 30/08/1961 | D853 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/09/1961 | 4982 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 09/09/1961 | 5531 | Transfer out to: | 83E | St Blazey | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 09/09/1961 | 5568 | Transfer out to: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Diesel | 43 | B-B | 4w/e | 09/09/1961 | D835 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 11/09/1961 | 5053 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 11/09/1961 | 5058 | Transfer out to: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Diesel | 43 | B-B | on | 26/09/1961 | D854 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | D2197 | Transfer in from: | 91W | To Western Region / GWR | ||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 4566 | Transfer in from: | PZ | Penzance | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 5515 | Transfer in from: | 83G | Penzance | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 5568 | Transfer in from: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | D2129 | Transfer out to: | 83E | St Blazey | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 5560 | Transfer out to: | 83C | Exeter | ||
Diesel | 43 | B-B | on | 25/10/1961 | D855 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | on | 25/10/1961 | D870 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | m/e | 11/1961 | 5515 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | 6836 | Transfer out to: | 86G | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | 7335 | Transfer out to: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Diesel | 43 | B-B | on | 16/11/1961 | D856 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | m/e | 12/1961 | 5511 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 02/12/1961 | 4588 | Transfer in from: | 83B | Taunton | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 02/12/1961 | 5521 | Transfer in from: | 83B | Taunton | ||
Diesel | 43 | B-B | 4w/e | 02/12/1961 | D837 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 43 | B-B | 4w/e | 02/12/1961 | D838 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 43 | B-B | on | 11/12/1961 | D857 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 43 | B-B | on | 15/12/1961 | D858 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | on | 29/12/1961 | D1000 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 30/12/1961 | 3787 | Transfer out to: | 83B | Taunton | ||
Diesel | 43 | B-B | on | 09/01/1962 | D859 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 43 | B-B | on | 22/01/1962 | D860 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/01/1962 | D3516 | Transfer out to: | 83E | St Blazey | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 27/01/1962 | 3686 | Transfer out to: | 86F | Aberbeeg | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 27/01/1962 | 5098 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | on | 12/02/1962 | D1001 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 43 | B-B | on | 14/02/1962 | D861 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 21/02/1962 | 5069 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4w/e | 24/02/1962 | 1420 | Transfer out to: | 86C | Hereford | ||
Diesel | 43 | B-B | 4w/e | 24/02/1962 | D848 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 43 | B-B | 4w/e | 24/02/1962 | D849 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 43 | B-B | on | 13/03/1962 | D862 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 14/03/1962 | 4095 | To Store | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 14/03/1962 | 5029 | To Store | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | on | 19/03/1962 | D1002 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 4w/e | 24/03/1962 | D6326 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/03/1962 | 6301 | Transfer out to: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Diesel | 43 | B-B | 4w/e | 24/03/1962 | D842 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 43 | B-B | 4w/e | 24/03/1962 | D843 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 43 | B-B | 4w/e | 24/03/1962 | D844 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | on | 29/03/1962 | D6338 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | m/e | 04/1962 | 4566 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | m/e | 04/1962 | 5521 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | m/e | 04/1962 | 5572 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | on | 02/04/1962 | D6339 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | on | 03/04/1962 | D6340 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 43 | B-B | on | 07/04/1962 | D863 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | on | 14/04/1962 | D1003 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 16/04/1962 | D4159 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/04/1962 | 4567 | Transfer in from: | 83F | Truro | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/04/1962 | 5564 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 21/04/1962 | 4679 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Diesel | 43 | B-B | 4w/e | 21/04/1962 | D845 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | m/e | 05/1962 | 4561 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 05/1962 | 4982 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 05/1962 | 9467 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | on | 10/05/1962 | D6343 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 43 | B-B | on | 10/05/1962 | D864 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | on | 11/05/1962 | D6342 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | on | 12/05/1962 | D1004 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | on | 12/05/1962 | D6341 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | on | 18/05/1962 | D6344 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | on | 19/05/1962 | D6345 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/05/1962 | D2183 | Transfer in from: | 83E | St Blazey | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 19/05/1962 | 3849 | Transfer in from: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 19/05/1962 | 4555 | Transfer in from: | 83E | St Blazey | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 19/05/1962 | 5645 | Transfer in from: | 86G | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 19/05/1962 | 6430 | Transfer in from: | 88B | Radyr | ||
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 19/05/1962 | 6438 | Transfer in from: | 88B | Radyr | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/05/1962 | 6860 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/05/1962 | 6873 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Diesel | 43 | B-B | 4w/e | 19/05/1962 | D846 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 43 | B-B | 4w/e | 19/05/1962 | D847 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 24/05/1962 | D4167 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | on | 08/06/1962 | D6346 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | on | 14/06/1962 | D6348 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | on | 14/06/1962 | D6349 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1962 | 4095 | Reinstated | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/06/1962 | 5917 | Transfer out to: | 83C | Exeter | ||
Diesel | 43 | B-B | 4w/e | 16/06/1962 | D839 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 43 | B-B | 4w/e | 16/06/1962 | D840 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 43 | B-B | 4w/e | 16/06/1962 | D841 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | on | 18/06/1962 | D1005 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | on | 27/06/1962 | D6350 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | on | 27/06/1962 | D6351 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 43 | B-B | on | 28/06/1962 | D865 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | m/e | 07/1962 | 1434 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | m/e | 07/1962 | 4588 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | m/e | 07/1962 | 5532 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | m/e | 07/1962 | 5541 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | on | 06/07/1962 | D1006 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | on | 12/07/1962 | D6352 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | on | 12/07/1962 | D6353 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 4570 | Transfer in from: | 83G | Penzance | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 6812 | Transfer in from: | 83G | Penzance | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 6825 | Transfer in from: | 83G | Penzance | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 6826 | Transfer in from: | PZ | Penzance | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 6868 | Transfer in from: | 83G | Penzance | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 6874 | Transfer in from: | 83G | Penzance | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 3862 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 6002 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 6016 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Stafford Road | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | D6338 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | D6339 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | D6340 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | on | 27/07/1962 | D1035 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | on | 01/08/1962 | D1007 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/08/1962 | D2175 | Transfer in from: | 83H | Plymouth Friary | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/08/1962 | D2176 | Transfer in from: | 83H | Plymouth Friary | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/08/1962 | D2177 | Transfer in from: | 83H | Plymouth Friary | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/08/1962 | D2178 | Transfer in from: | 83H | Plymouth Friary | ||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 11/08/1962 | 4574 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/08/1962 | 6824 | Transfer in from: | 83G | Penzance | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 11/08/1962 | 3849 | Transfer out to: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 4w/e | 11/08/1962 | D6342 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 4w/e | 11/08/1962 | D6343 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 4w/e | 11/08/1962 | D6344 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 4w/e | 11/08/1962 | D6345 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/08/1962 | 6804 | Transfer out to: | 87F | Llanelli | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/08/1962 | 6815 | Transfer out to: | 87F | Llanelli | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 13/08/1962 | 4087 | To Store | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | on | 29/08/1962 | D1036 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | on | 31/08/1962 | D1037 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 43 | B-B | m/e | 09/1962 | D850 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | m/e | 09/1962 | 4567 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | m/e | 09/1962 | 5544 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | on | 04/09/1962 | D1008 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | on | 07/09/1962 | D1038 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | on | 07/09/1962 | D1039 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 90658 | Transfer out to: | 24F | Fleetwood | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 4978 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | D6339 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | D6342 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | D6343 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | D6344 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | D6345 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 7909 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | D1007 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | D1008 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 06/10/1962 | 4095 | Transfer out to: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | D6351 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | D6352 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | D6353 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 6812 | Transfer out to: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 6824 | Transfer out to: | 81E | Didcot | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 6825 | Transfer out to: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 6826 | Transfer out to: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 6863 | Transfer out to: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 6868 | Transfer out to: | 81E | Didcot | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 6874 | Transfer out to: | 81E | Didcot | ||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | D822 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | D823 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 43 | B-B | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | D851 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 43 | B-B | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | D852 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | on | 22/10/1962 | 1003 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 1015 | Transfer in from: | 81E | Didcot | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | D1000 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | D1001 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | D1002 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | D1003 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | D1004 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | D1005 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | D1006 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | D1035 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | D1036 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | D1037 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | D1038 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | D1039 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 6938 | Transfer out to: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | on | 13/11/1962 | 1015 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 13/11/1962 | 6438 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 2w/e | 17/11/1962 | D6347 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 2w/e | 17/11/1962 | 6421 | Transfer in from: | 84H | Wellington | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 2w/e | 17/11/1962 | D6349 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 2w/e | 17/11/1962 | D6350 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 2w/e | 17/11/1962 | 7909 | Transfer out to: | 83B | Taunton | ||
Steam | 1361 | 0-6-0ST | on | 20/11/1962 | 1363 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 15/12/1962 | 1006 | Transfer out to: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 15/12/1962 | 2899 | Transfer out to: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | 4658 | Transfer out to: | 87H | Neyland | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | 5564 | Transfer out to: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | 5569 | Transfer out to: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | 6430 | Transfer out to: | 88H | Tondu | ||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | 4570 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | 5568 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | 6421 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | m/e | 03/1963 | 4574 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 09/03/1963 | 4591 | Transfer in from: | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 09/03/1963 | 4591 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Laira | ||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | 4w/e | 06/04/1963 | D827 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 06/04/1963 | 6400 | Transfer out to: | 72A | Exmouth Junction | ||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | 4w/e | 06/04/1963 | D820 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | m/e | 06/1963 | 5645 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 4w/e | 01/06/1963 | D1039 | Transfer in from: | 88A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 4w/e | 01/06/1963 | D1057 | Transfer in from: | 88A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/06/1963 | D3516 | Transfer in from: | 83E | St Blazey | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/06/1963 | D3522 | Transfer in from: | 83C | Exeter | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/06/1963 | D4005 | Transfer in from: | 83E | St Blazey | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 01/06/1963 | 41302 | Transfer in from: | 72D | Plymouth Friary | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 01/06/1963 | 41315 | Transfer in from: | 72D | Plymouth Friary | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 01/06/1963 | 41316 | Transfer in from: | 72D | Plymouth Friary | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 01/06/1963 | 41317 | Transfer in from: | 72D | Plymouth Friary | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/06/1963 | D3520 | Transfer out to: | 88M | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/06/1963 | D3524 | Transfer out to: | 83E | St Blazey | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 01/06/1963 | 4591 | Transfer out to: | 72C | Yeovil Town | ||
Diesel | 43 | B-B | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | D851 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 43 | B-B | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | D852 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | on | 08/09/1963 | 73161 | Transfer in from: | 56A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | on | 08/09/1963 | 73162 | Transfer in from: | 56A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 28/09/1963 | 5531 | Transfer in from: | 83E | St Blazey | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 4w/e | 28/09/1963 | D1039 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 4w/e | 28/09/1963 | D1057 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 28/09/1963 | 41302 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Exmouth Junction | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 28/09/1963 | 41315 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Exmouth Junction | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 28/09/1963 | 41316 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Exmouth Junction | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 28/09/1963 | 41317 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Exmouth Junction | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 4w/e | 28/09/1963 | D6326 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 30/11/1963 | 5531 | Transfer out to: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/11/1963 | 6921 | Transfer out to: | 81E | Didcot | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 30/11/1963 | 7022 | Transfer out to: | 86C | Hereford | ||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | m/e | 12/1963 | 4555 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | D1010 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | D1015 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | D1051 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | D1065 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | D1068 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | D1015 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | on | 28/01/1964 | D1027 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 4w/e | 22/02/1964 | D1009 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 4w/e | 22/02/1964 | D1015 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 4w/e | 22/02/1964 | D1049 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | D1001 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | D1003 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | D1004 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | D1005 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | D1019 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | D1035 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | D6349 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | D6350 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | D7027 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | D7028 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | D7072 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | D7073 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | D1068 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 3w/e | 04/05/1964 | D4158 | Transfer in from: | 83E | St Blazey | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 3w/e | 04/05/1964 | D7069 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 3w/e | 04/05/1964 | D7070 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 3w/e | 04/05/1964 | D3522 | Transfer out to: | 83B | Taunton | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 3w/e | 04/05/1964 | D7027 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 3w/e | 04/05/1964 | D7073 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 43 | B-B | m/e | 06/1964 | D850 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 43 | B-B | m/e | 06/1964 | D850 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | D7089 | Transfer in from: | 88A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | D7090 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | D7095 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | D7096 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | D7097 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | D7098 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | D7099 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | D7100 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | D3516 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Exmouth Junction | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 4978 | Transfer out to: | 83C | Westbury | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | D6343 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | D7069 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | D7070 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | D7072 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 7916 | Transfer out to: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Diesel | 43 | B-B | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | D851 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 43 | B-B | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | D852 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 43 | B-B | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | D853 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 43 | B-B | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | D854 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 43 | B-B | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | D855 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 4w/e | 20/07/1964 | D6327 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 4w/e | 20/07/1964 | D6328 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 4w/e | 20/07/1964 | D7072 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 24/08/1964 | D2127 | Transfer out to: | 84B | St Blazey | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 08/11/1964 | D2128 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 08/11/1964 | D2183 | Transfer out to: | 84B | St Blazey | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 08/11/1964 | D3523 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | w/e | 15/11/1964 | D6339 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | m/e | 12/1964 | 73161 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 2w/e | 10/01/1965 | D7072 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 2w/e | 10/01/1965 | 73162 | Transfer out to: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 3w/e | 28/03/1965 | D7089 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 4w/e | 13/06/1965 | D6341 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 4w/e | 13/06/1965 | D6342 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 4w/e | 13/06/1965 | D6344 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 4w/e | 13/06/1965 | D6345 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 4w/e | 13/06/1965 | D6346 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 4w/e | 13/06/1965 | D6347 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 4w/e | 13/06/1965 | D6348 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 4w/e | 13/06/1965 | D6349 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 4w/e | 13/06/1965 | D6350 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | D1030 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | D1031 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | D1032 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | D1033 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | D1039 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | D1044 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | D1045 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | D1046 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | D1047 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | D1048 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | D1050 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | D7037 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | D7038 | Transfer in from: | 88A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | D7039 | Transfer in from: | 88A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | D7068 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | D7069 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | D7070 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | D7074 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | D7086 | Transfer in from: | 88A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | D820 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | D822 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | D823 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | D824 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | D825 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | D826 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | D828 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | D829 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | D831 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | D832 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | D6327 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | D6328 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 43 | B-B | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | D856 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 43 | B-B | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | D857 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 43 | B-B | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | D858 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 43 | B-B | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | D859 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 43 | B-B | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | D860 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 43 | B-B | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | D861 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 43 | B-B | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | D862 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 43 | B-B | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | D863 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 43 | B-B | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | D864 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 43 | B-B | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | D865 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 4w/e | 08/08/1965 | D7027 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 6w/e | 19/09/1965 | D1068 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | 6w/e | 19/09/1965 | D2175 | Transfer out to: | 83B | Taunton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 6w/e | 19/09/1965 | D3526 | Transfer out to: | 84C | Truro | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 6w/e | 19/09/1965 | D6322 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 6w/e | 19/09/1965 | D6323 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 6w/e | 19/09/1965 | D6325 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 6w/e | 19/09/1965 | D7027 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 6w/e | 19/09/1965 | D7037 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | 6w/e | 19/09/1965 | D828 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | 6w/e | 19/09/1965 | D829 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | 6w/e | 19/09/1965 | D831 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | 6w/e | 19/09/1965 | D832 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | D1000 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | D1034 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | D1036 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | D1072 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | D1073 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | D3521 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Exmouth Junction | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | D7038 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | D7039 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | D1007 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | D1008 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | D1011 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | D1012 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | D1013 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | D1014 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | D1016 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | D1017 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | D1018 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | D1022 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | D1023 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | D1025 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | D1026 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | D1037 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | D1038 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | D1040 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | D1042 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | D1052 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | D1054 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | D1055 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | D1056 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | D1057 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | D1058 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | D1059 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | D1060 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | D1061 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | D1062 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | D1063 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | D1064 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | D1066 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | D1067 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | D1069 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | D1070 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | D6320 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | D6321 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | D7096 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | D7097 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | D7098 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | D7099 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | D7100 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 7w/e | 19/06/1966 | D7068 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 7w/e | 19/06/1966 | D7069 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 7w/e | 19/06/1966 | D7070 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 7w/e | 19/06/1966 | D7074 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 7w/e | 19/06/1966 | D7086 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 7w/e | 19/06/1966 | D7090 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 7w/e | 19/06/1966 | D7095 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | 7w/e | 19/06/1966 | D827 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | 7w/e | 19/06/1966 | D866 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | 7w/e | 19/06/1966 | D867 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | 7w/e | 19/06/1966 | D868 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | 7w/e | 19/06/1966 | D869 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | 7w/e | 19/06/1966 | D870 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | m/e | 08/1966 | D6318 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 10w/e | 28/08/1966 | D6317 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 10w/e | 28/08/1966 | D6319 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 8w/e | 30/10/1966 | D1027 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 8w/e | 30/10/1966 | D1030 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 8w/e | 30/10/1966 | D6316 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | q/e | 15/01/1967 | D1025 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | q/e | 15/01/1967 | D6314 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | q/e | 15/01/1967 | D6315 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 2w/e | 15/01/1967 | D6324 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | m/e | 31/01/1967 | D6314 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | m/e | 31/01/1967 | D6313 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | m/e | 28/02/1967 | D6312 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | m/e | 31/03/1967 | D1026 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | m/e | 31/03/1967 | D817 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | m/e | 31/03/1967 | D818 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | m/e | 31/03/1967 | D819 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | m/e | 31/03/1967 | D820 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | m/e | 31/03/1967 | D821 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | m/e | 31/03/1967 | D822 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | m/e | 31/03/1967 | D823 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | m/e | 31/03/1967 | D824 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | m/e | 31/03/1967 | D825 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | m/e | 31/03/1967 | D826 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 30/04/1967 | D3355 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 14/05/1967 | D2127 | Transfer in from: | 84B | St Blazey | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 14/05/1967 | D2197 | Transfer out to: | 83B | Taunton | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 2w/e | 31/05/1967 | D6301 | To Store | ||||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | m/e | 30/06/1967 | D6301 | Reinstated | 98S | |||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 30/06/1967 | D2197 | Transfer in from: | 83B | Taunton | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | m/e | 30/06/1967 | D6322 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | m/e | 30/06/1967 | D6310 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | m/e | 30/06/1967 | D6311 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | D2197 | To Store | ||||
Diesel | D20/2 | A1A-A1A | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | D601 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Laira | ||
Diesel | D20/2 | A1A-A1A | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | D602 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Laira | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | D7029 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | D7088 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | D822 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | D823 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | D824 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | D825 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | D826 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | D827 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | D828 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | D829 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | D831 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | D832 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | D866 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | D867 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | D868 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | D869 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | D870 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | D3355 | Transfer out to: | 83B | Taunton | ||
Diesel | D20/2 | A1A-A1A | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | D601 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Laira | ||
Diesel | D20/2 | A1A-A1A | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | D602 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Laira | ||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | D803 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | D804 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | D805 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | D806 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | D807 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | D808 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | D809 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | D810 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | D811 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | D812 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | D813 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | D814 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | D815 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | D816 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | D20/2 | A1A-A1A | 4w/e | 30/09/1967 | D604 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/10/1967 | D2176 | To Store | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/10/1967 | D2119 | Transfer in from: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 11/1967 | D2197 | Reinstated | 98S | |||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | on | 30/12/1967 | D6301 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | D20/2 | A1A-A1A | on | 31/12/1967 | D600 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | D20/2 | A1A-A1A | on | 31/12/1967 | D601 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | D20/2 | A1A-A1A | on | 31/12/1967 | D602 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | D20/2 | A1A-A1A | on | 31/12/1967 | D603 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 01/1968 | D2197 | To Store | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | D1002 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | D2140 | Transfer in from: | 83B | Taunton | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | D6311 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | D6349 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | D1000 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | D1001 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | D1003 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | D1004 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | D1005 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | D1007 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | D1008 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | D1009 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | D1010 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | D1012 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | D7028 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | m/e | 05/1968 | D6318 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | on | 11/05/1968 | D2127 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | on | 26/05/1968 | D6300 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | on | 26/05/1968 | D6302 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | on | 26/05/1968 | D6303 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | on | 26/05/1968 | D6304 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | on | 26/05/1968 | D6305 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 10w/e | 01/06/1968 | D6313 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 10w/e | 01/06/1968 | D6315 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 10w/e | 01/06/1968 | D6317 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | 10w/e | 01/06/1968 | D803 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | 10w/e | 01/06/1968 | D804 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | 10w/e | 01/06/1968 | D805 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | 10w/e | 01/06/1968 | D806 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 10w/e | 01/06/1968 | D1002 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 10w/e | 01/06/1968 | D1011 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 10w/e | 01/06/1968 | D1013 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 10w/e | 01/06/1968 | D1014 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | 10w/e | 01/06/1968 | D2177 | Transfer out to: | 83B | Taunton | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 10w/e | 01/06/1968 | D6349 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 10w/e | 01/06/1968 | D7029 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 10w/e | 01/06/1968 | D7088 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 7w/e | 27/07/1968 | D6330 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 7w/e | 27/07/1968 | D6336 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 7w/e | 27/07/1968 | D6348 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | 7w/e | 27/07/1968 | D814 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | 7w/e | 27/07/1968 | D819 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | 7w/e | 27/07/1968 | D805 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | 7w/e | 27/07/1968 | D806 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | on | 03/08/1968 | D6313 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | on | 03/08/1968 | D801 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | on | 23/09/1968 | D6311 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | on | 23/09/1968 | D6317 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | m/e | 10/1968 | D6330 | Transfer out to: | 98W | |||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | on | 05/10/1968 | D800 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | on | 05/10/1968 | D802 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 9w/e | 09/11/1968 | D1014 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 9w/e | 09/11/1968 | D1041 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 9w/e | 09/11/1968 | D1043 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 9w/e | 09/11/1968 | D1071 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 9w/e | 09/11/1968 | D4004 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 9w/e | 09/11/1968 | D6319 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 9w/e | 09/11/1968 | D6323 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | 9w/e | 09/11/1968 | D808 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 9w/e | 09/11/1968 | D1031 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 9w/e | 09/11/1968 | D1062 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 9w/e | 09/11/1968 | D1063 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 9w/e | 09/11/1968 | D1066 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 9w/e | 09/11/1968 | D3521 | Transfer out to: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 9w/e | 09/11/1968 | D6348 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | on | 21/12/1968 | D6306 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 9w/e | 25/01/1969 | D1007 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 9w/e | 25/01/1969 | D1008 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 9w/e | 25/01/1969 | D1009 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 9w/e | 25/01/1969 | D1010 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 9w/e | 25/01/1969 | D1011 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 9w/e | 25/01/1969 | D3524 | Transfer in from: | 83E | St Blazey | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 9w/e | 25/01/1969 | D1015 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 9w/e | 25/01/1969 | D1040 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 9w/e | 25/01/1969 | D1055 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 9w/e | 25/01/1969 | D1061 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 9w/e | 25/01/1969 | D1069 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 9w/e | 25/01/1969 | D6336 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 09/03/1969 | D3524 | Transfer in from: | 84A | Laira | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 09/03/1969 | D3524 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Laira | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 5w/e | 15/03/1969 | D1005 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 5w/e | 15/03/1969 | D1006 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 5w/e | 15/03/1969 | D1012 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 5w/e | 15/03/1969 | D1020 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 5w/e | 15/03/1969 | D1021 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 5w/e | 15/03/1969 | D1059 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 5w/e | 15/03/1969 | D1065 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 5w/e | 15/03/1969 | D1067 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 5w/e | 15/03/1969 | D1070 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 23/03/1969 | D3524 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 6w/e | 03/05/1969 | D1024 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 6w/e | 03/05/1969 | D1030 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 6w/e | 03/05/1969 | D6348 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 6w/e | 03/05/1969 | D1034 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 6w/e | 03/05/1969 | D1038 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | on | 03/05/1969 | D6314 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 5w/e | 14/06/1969 | D1004 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 5w/e | 14/06/1969 | D1028 | Transfer in from: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 5w/e | 14/06/1969 | D1040 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 5w/e | 14/06/1969 | D1053 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 14/06/1969 | D2134 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 5w/e | 14/06/1969 | D6356 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 5w/e | 14/06/1969 | D1032 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 5w/e | 14/06/1969 | D1072 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 14/06/1969 | D2178 | Transfer out to: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 5w/e | 14/06/1969 | D6348 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 8w/e | 16/08/1969 | D1068 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | m/e | 27/09/1969 | D6330 | Reinstated | 98W | |||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 5w/e | 27/09/1969 | D6356 | To Store | ||||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | 4w/e | 01/11/1969 | D805 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | 4w/e | 01/11/1969 | D806 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 4w/e | 01/11/1969 | D1060 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 4w/e | 01/11/1969 | D1064 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 4w/e | 01/11/1969 | D1071 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/12/1969 | D4130 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 4w/e | 06/12/1969 | D1073 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/12/1969 | D4167 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 2w/e | 27/12/1969 | D1064 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 4w/e | 24/01/1970 | D6337 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 4w/e | 24/01/1970 | D6330 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 04/04/1970 | D2128 | Reinstated | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 9w/e | 04/04/1970 | D1001 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 9w/e | 04/04/1970 | D1002 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 9w/e | 04/04/1970 | D1071 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | 9w/e | 04/04/1970 | D821 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 9w/e | 04/04/1970 | D1009 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 9w/e | 04/04/1970 | D1030 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 9w/e | 04/04/1970 | D1035 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | 9w/e | 04/04/1970 | D814 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | 9w/e | 04/04/1970 | D819 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | on | 04/04/1970 | D2140 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 7w/e | 29/05/1970 | D1068 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 7w/e | 29/05/1970 | D1071 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | q/e | 22/08/1970 | D1071 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | q/e | 22/08/1970 | D6308 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | q/e | 14/11/1970 | D1068 | Transfer out to: | 87A | Landore | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 19/12/1970 | D2119 | Transfer out to: | 87A | Landore | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 8w/e | 27/02/1971 | D4005 | Transfer out to: | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | on | 27/03/1971 | D6307 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | m/e | 04/1971 | D6318 | To Store | ||||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | q/e | 04/1971 | D6319 | Transfer out to: | 98W | |||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | on | 02/05/1971 | D6319 | Reinstated | 98W | |||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | q/e | 22/05/1971 | D6309 | To Store | ||||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | q/e | 22/05/1971 | D6315 | To Store | ||||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | q/e | 22/05/1971 | D6323 | To Store | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | q/e | 22/05/1971 | D1069 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | q/e | 22/05/1971 | D1070 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | q/e | 22/05/1971 | D1073 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | q/e | 22/05/1971 | D4184 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | q/e | 22/05/1971 | D6308 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | q/e | 22/05/1971 | D6326 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | q/e | 22/05/1971 | D6328 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | q/e | 22/05/1971 | D6330 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | q/e | 22/05/1971 | D6333 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | q/e | 22/05/1971 | D6334 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | q/e | 22/05/1971 | D6336 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | q/e | 22/05/1971 | D6338 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | q/e | 22/05/1971 | D6339 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | q/e | 22/05/1971 | D6340 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | q/e | 22/05/1971 | D6343 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | q/e | 22/05/1971 | D6348 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | q/e | 22/05/1971 | D6356 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | q/e | 22/05/1971 | D4010 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | q/e | 22/05/1971 | D806 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | q/e | 22/05/1971 | D808 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | q/e | 22/05/1971 | D6340 | To Store | ||||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | on | 28/05/1971 | D828 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 6w/e | 03/07/1971 | D4017 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 6w/e | 03/07/1971 | D3525 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 2w/e | 17/07/1971 | D6328 | To Store | ||||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 2w/e | 24/07/1971 | D6348 | To Store | ||||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 6w/e | 14/08/1971 | D6308 | To Store | ||||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | 6w/e | 14/08/1971 | D870 | To Store | ||||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 4w/e | 11/09/1971 | D6319 | To Store | ||||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | on | 23/09/1971 | D6330 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 25/09/1971 | D2128 | Transfer out to: | 98W | |||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 7w/e | 03/10/1971 | D6326 | To Store | ||||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | on | 03/10/1971 | D6336 | Transfer out to: | 98W | |||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | on | 03/10/1971 | D6339 | Transfer out to: | 98W | |||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | on | 03/10/1971 | D6322 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | on | 03/10/1971 | D6334 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | on | 03/10/1971 | D6343 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | on | 03/10/1971 | D6356 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | on | 03/10/1971 | D804 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | on | 03/10/1971 | D822 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | on | 03/10/1971 | D823 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | on | 03/10/1971 | D831 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | on | 03/10/1971 | D868 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | on | 03/10/1971 | D869 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | on | 05/10/1971 | D1000 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | on | 05/10/1971 | D1003 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | on | 05/10/1971 | D1009 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | on | 05/10/1971 | D1013 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | on | 05/10/1971 | D1015 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | on | 05/10/1971 | D1025 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | on | 05/10/1971 | D1026 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | on | 05/10/1971 | D1030 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | on | 05/10/1971 | D1031 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | on | 05/10/1971 | D1035 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | on | 05/10/1971 | D1060 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | on | 05/10/1971 | D1061 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | on | 05/10/1971 | D1062 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | on | 05/10/1971 | D1063 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | on | 05/10/1971 | D1066 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | on | 05/10/1971 | D1068 | Transfer in from: | 87A | Landore | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D7573 | Transfer in from: | D09 | Manchester Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D7574 | Transfer in from: | D09 | Manchester Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D7575 | Transfer in from: | D09 | Manchester Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D7577 | Transfer in from: | D09 | Manchester Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D7656 | Transfer in from: | D08 | Liverpool Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D7657 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D7675 | Transfer in from: | D08 | Liverpool Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D7676 | Transfer in from: | D08 | Liverpool Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D7677 | Transfer in from: | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 9w/e | 16/10/1971 | D1027 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 9w/e | 16/10/1971 | D1029 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 9w/e | 16/10/1971 | D1032 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 9w/e | 16/10/1971 | D1034 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 9w/e | 16/10/1971 | D1038 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 9w/e | 16/10/1971 | D1055 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 9w/e | 16/10/1971 | D1059 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 9w/e | 16/10/1971 | D1065 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 9w/e | 16/10/1971 | D1067 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 9w/e | 16/10/1971 | D1072 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 9w/e | 16/10/1971 | D5180 | Transfer in from: | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | 9w/e | 16/10/1971 | D803 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | 9w/e | 16/10/1971 | D805 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | 9w/e | 16/10/1971 | D821 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | 9w/e | 16/10/1971 | D824 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | 9w/e | 16/10/1971 | D825 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | 9w/e | 16/10/1971 | D827 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | 9w/e | 16/10/1971 | D829 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | 9w/e | 16/10/1971 | D832 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | 9w/e | 16/10/1971 | D866 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | on | 18/10/1971 | D826 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | on | 18/10/1971 | D867 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | on | 21/10/1971 | D6337 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 3w/e | 06/11/1971 | D6336 | Reinstated | 98W | |||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 3w/e | 06/11/1971 | D6339 | Reinstated | 98W | |||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 8w/e | 31/12/1971 | D6333 | To Store | ||||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 8w/e | 31/12/1971 | D6336 | To Store | ||||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 8w/e | 31/12/1971 | D6338 | To Store | ||||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 8w/e | 31/12/1971 | D6339 | To Store | ||||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 08/01/1972 | D7502 | Transfer in from: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 08/01/1972 | D7503 | Transfer in from: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 08/01/1972 | D7504 | Transfer in from: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 08/01/1972 | D7505 | Transfer in from: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 08/01/1972 | D7506 | Transfer in from: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 08/01/1972 | D7507 | Transfer in from: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 08/01/1972 | D7508 | Transfer in from: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 08/01/1972 | D7509 | Transfer in from: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | 9w/e | 08/01/1972 | D805 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | 9w/e | 08/01/1972 | D806 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | 9w/e | 08/01/1972 | D807 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | 9w/e | 08/01/1972 | D810 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | 9w/e | 08/01/1972 | D812 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | 9w/e | 08/01/1972 | D818 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | 9w/e | 08/01/1972 | D820 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | 9w/e | 08/01/1972 | D821 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | 9w/e | 08/01/1972 | D824 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | 9w/e | 08/01/1972 | D832 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 9w/e | 08/01/1972 | D5180 | Transfer out to: | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 9w/e | 08/01/1972 | D7656 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 9w/e | 08/01/1972 | D7657 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 9w/e | 08/01/1972 | D7676 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 9w/e | 08/01/1972 | D7677 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | on | 01/05/1972 | D814 | Reinstated | 98W | |||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | on | 01/05/1972 | D825 | Reinstated | 98W | |||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | on | 01/05/1972 | D829 | Reinstated | 98W | |||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 9w/e | 13/05/1972 | D7675 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 9w/e | 12/08/1972 | D7509 | Transfer out to: | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | on | 23/08/1972 | D825 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | on | 26/08/1972 | D829 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | on | 26/09/1972 | D807 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | on | 24/10/1972 | D805 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 28/10/1972 | D139 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 28/10/1972 | D148 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 28/10/1972 | D153 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 28/10/1972 | D160 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 28/10/1972 | D7502 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 28/10/1972 | D7577 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | on | 01/11/1972 | D818 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | on | 02/11/1972 | D806 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | on | 02/11/1972 | D820 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | on | 03/11/1972 | D812 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | on | 07/11/1972 | D814 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | w/e | 11/11/1972 | D832 | To Store | ||||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 11/11/1972 | D138 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 11/11/1972 | D140 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/11/1972 | D7503 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/11/1972 | D7504 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | on | 03/12/1972 | D810 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | on | 03/12/1972 | D821 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | Warship | B-B | on | 03/12/1972 | D824 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/12/1972 | D7624 | Transfer in from: | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/12/1972 | D7625 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/12/1972 | D7656 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/12/1972 | D7657 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/12/1972 | D7675 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/12/1972 | D7676 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/12/1972 | D7677 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/12/1972 | D7505 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/12/1972 | D7507 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/12/1972 | D7508 | Transfer out to: | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 20/01/1973 | D4125 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 20/01/1973 | D4004 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 10/02/1973 | D141 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 17/02/1973 | D4129 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 17/02/1973 | D4158 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | on | 06/05/1973 | D1019 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | on | 06/05/1973 | D1032 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 12/05/1973 | D142 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 12/05/1973 | D143 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 12/05/1973 | D146 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | on | 04/06/1973 | D1018 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | on | 04/06/1973 | D1020 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 23/06/1973 | D4158 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 23/06/1973 | D4159 | Transfer out to: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | on | 21/07/1973 | D1039 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | on | 21/07/1973 | D1042 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | on | 01/08/1973 | D1004 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | on | 01/08/1973 | D1017 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 06/10/1973 | D7506 | Transfer out to: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 06/10/1973 | D7624 | Transfer out to: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 06/10/1973 | D7625 | Transfer out to: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | on | 08/10/1973 | D1038 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 10/11/1973 | D3810 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 10/11/1973 | D4130 | Transfer out to: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | on | 18/11/1973 | D1024 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | on | 18/11/1973 | D1060 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 12/01/1974 | D3845 | Transfer in from: | NH | Newton Heath | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | on | 29/01/1974 | D1002 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | on | 29/01/1974 | D1007 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | on | 11/02/1974 | D1000 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/03/1974 | D7588 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/03/1974 | D7624 | Transfer in from: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/03/1974 | D7625 | Transfer in from: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | w/e | 06/04/1974 | 50003 | Transfer in from: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | w/e | 06/04/1974 | 50027 | Transfer in from: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | w/e | 04/05/1974 | 50009 | Transfer in from: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 08945 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 50007 | Transfer in from: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 50011 | Transfer in from: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 50013 | Transfer in from: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 50014 | Transfer in from: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 50015 | Transfer in from: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 50026 | Transfer in from: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 50028 | Transfer in from: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 08954 | Transfer out to: | PZ | Penzance | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 25238 | Transfer out to: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 25325 | Transfer out to: | CW | Cricklewood East | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 18/05/1974 | D3066 | Transfer in from: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | w/e | 18/05/1974 | 50006 | Transfer in from: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 18/05/1974 | 46016 | Transfer out to: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 18/05/1974 | 46023 | Transfer out to: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | w/e | 25/05/1974 | 50006 | Transfer out to: | CD | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/06/1974 | 08576 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/06/1974 | D3066 | Transfer out to: | SW | Swindon | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/06/1974 | 08488 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/06/1974 | 08489 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | on | 06/08/1974 | D1014 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 10/08/1974 | 08576 | Transfer out to: | BZ | St Blazey | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | on | 22/08/1974 | D1062 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | on | 29/08/1974 | D1073 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 21/09/1974 | 08678 | Transfer out to: | OC | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 28/09/1974 | 08394 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 28/09/1974 | 08795 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 28/09/1974 | 08849 | Transfer out to: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | 25171 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | 25172 | Transfer in from: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | 25219 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | 25238 | Transfer in from: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | 46007 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | 46008 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | 46010 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | on | 21/10/1974 | D1008 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | on | 21/10/1974 | D1061 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 02/11/1974 | 08113 | Transfer in from: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 02/11/1974 | 08928 | Transfer out to: | PZ | Penzance | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | on | 12/11/1974 | D1066 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | on | 18/11/1974 | D1029 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/12/1974 | 08955 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/12/1974 | 08643 | Transfer out to: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | on | 16/12/1974 | D1045 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 28/12/1974 | 08643 | Transfer in from: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 28/12/1974 | 08955 | Transfer out to: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | on | 05/01/1975 | D1003 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | on | 05/01/1975 | D1035 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 25/01/1975 | 08891 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 25/01/1975 | 08795 | Transfer out to: | SW | Swindon | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | on | 01/02/1975 | D1031 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | on | 01/02/1975 | D1044 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 08/02/1975 | 47026 | Transfer in from: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 08/02/1975 | 47027 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 08/02/1975 | 47028 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 08/02/1975 | 47029 | Transfer in from: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 08/03/1975 | 08140 | Transfer in from: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 08/03/1975 | 08584 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 08/03/1975 | 08891 | Transfer out to: | DY | Derby | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 08/03/1975 | 08899 | Transfer out to: | DY | Derby | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/03/1975 | 08937 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/03/1975 | 08584 | Transfer out to: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | on | 06/04/1975 | D1006 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | on | 06/04/1975 | D1050 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/04/1975 | 50016 | Transfer in from: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | 47001 | Transfer in from: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | 47020 | Transfer in from: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | 47024 | Transfer in from: | LE | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | 47030 | Transfer in from: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | 47031 | Transfer in from: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | 47033 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | 47035 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | 50020 | Transfer in from: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | w/e | 10/05/1975 | 50021 | Transfer in from: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | 25171 | Transfer out to: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | 25172 | Transfer out to: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | 25219 | Transfer out to: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 3w/e | 07/06/1975 | 25238 | Transfer out to: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 3w/e | 12/07/1975 | 25220 | Transfer in from: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | 3w/e | 12/07/1975 | 46011 | Transfer out to: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | w/e | 19/07/1975 | 50019 | Transfer in from: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 3w/e | 09/08/1975 | 25093 | Transfer in from: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 3w/e | 09/08/1975 | 25094 | Transfer in from: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 3w/e | 09/08/1975 | 25096 | Transfer in from: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 3w/e | 09/08/1975 | 25098 | Transfer in from: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 3w/e | 09/08/1975 | 47032 | Transfer in from: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/08/1975 | 25306 | Transfer out to: | CD | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/08/1975 | 25307 | Transfer out to: | CD | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/08/1975 | 25326 | Transfer out to: | CD | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/08/1975 | 25327 | Transfer out to: | CD | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 2w/e | 23/08/1975 | 25091 | Transfer in from: | BS | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 2w/e | 23/08/1975 | 25092 | Transfer in from: | TO | Toton | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 2w/e | 23/08/1975 | 25274 | Transfer out to: | BS | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 2w/e | 23/08/1975 | 25275 | Transfer out to: | BS | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 06/09/1975 | 25077 | Transfer in from: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | on | 05/10/1975 | D1040 | Transfer out to: | 98W | |||
Diesel | Western | C-C | on | 06/10/1975 | D1011 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | on | 06/10/1975 | D1025 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | on | 06/10/1975 | D1026 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | on | 06/10/1975 | D1034 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | on | 06/10/1975 | D1052 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | on | 06/10/1975 | D1059 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | on | 06/10/1975 | D1069 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 09/10/1975 | D1040 | Reinstated | 98W | ||||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/10/1975 | 25063 | Transfer in from: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/10/1975 | 25169 | Transfer in from: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/10/1975 | 25170 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/10/1975 | 25215 | Transfer in from: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/10/1975 | 25216 | Transfer in from: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/10/1975 | 25217 | Transfer in from: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 11/10/1975 | 46011 | Transfer in from: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 11/10/1975 | 46012 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 11/10/1975 | 46013 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 11/10/1975 | 46014 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 11/10/1975 | 46015 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/10/1975 | 25091 | Transfer out to: | HA | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/10/1975 | 25092 | Transfer out to: | HA | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/10/1975 | 25093 | Transfer out to: | HA | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/10/1975 | 25094 | Transfer out to: | HA | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/10/1975 | 25096 | Transfer out to: | HA | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/10/1975 | 25098 | Transfer out to: | HA | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/10/1975 | 47001 | Transfer out to: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | on | 02/11/1975 | D1012 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | on | 02/11/1975 | D1027 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 08/11/1975 | 25168 | Transfer in from: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 08/11/1975 | 25077 | Transfer out to: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 08/11/1975 | 47020 | Transfer out to: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | on | 11/12/1975 | D1046 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | on | 11/12/1975 | D1064 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | on | 29/12/1975 | D1016 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | on | 05/01/1976 | D1055 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 10/01/1976 | 47020 | Transfer in from: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | w/e | 10/01/1976 | 50017 | Transfer in from: | CD | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 10/01/1976 | 25063 | Transfer out to: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 10/01/1976 | 25168 | Transfer out to: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | on | 24/01/1976 | D1067 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 07/02/1976 | 50006 | Transfer in from: | CD | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 07/02/1976 | 50045 | Transfer in from: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | on | 29/02/1976 | D1040 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | on | 29/02/1976 | D1047 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 06/03/1976 | 46016 | Transfer in from: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 06/03/1976 | 46017 | Transfer in from: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | w/e | 06/03/1976 | 50010 | Transfer in from: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | on | 04/04/1976 | D1043 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | on | 04/04/1976 | D1063 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 10/04/1976 | 50001 | Transfer in from: | OC | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 10/04/1976 | 50002 | Transfer in from: | OC | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 10/04/1976 | 50004 | Transfer in from: | OC | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 10/04/1976 | 50005 | Transfer in from: | OC | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 10/04/1976 | 50050 | Transfer in from: | OC | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | on | 19/04/1976 | D1030 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | on | 26/04/1976 | D1049 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 01/05/1976 | 08954 | Transfer in from: | PZ | Penzance | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 01/05/1976 | 08643 | Transfer out to: | PZ | Penzance | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | on | 02/05/1976 | D1057 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 08/05/1976 | 08824 | Transfer in from: | BZ | St Blazey | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 08/05/1976 | 25052 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 08/05/1976 | 25080 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 08/05/1976 | 25227 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | w/e | 08/05/1976 | 50008 | Transfer in from: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | w/e | 08/05/1976 | 50012 | Transfer in from: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | w/e | 08/05/1976 | 50018 | Transfer in from: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | w/e | 08/05/1976 | 50022 | Transfer in from: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | w/e | 08/05/1976 | 50023 | Transfer in from: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | w/e | 08/05/1976 | 50024 | Transfer in from: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | w/e | 08/05/1976 | 50031 | Transfer in from: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | w/e | 08/05/1976 | 50034 | Transfer in from: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | w/e | 08/05/1976 | 50036 | Transfer in from: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 08/05/1976 | 08113 | Transfer out to: | BZ | St Blazey | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 08/05/1976 | 46011 | Transfer out to: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 08/05/1976 | 46012 | Transfer out to: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 08/05/1976 | 46013 | Transfer out to: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 08/05/1976 | 46014 | Transfer out to: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 08/05/1976 | 46015 | Transfer out to: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 08/05/1976 | 46016 | Transfer out to: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 08/05/1976 | 46017 | Transfer out to: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 08/05/1976 | 47020 | Transfer out to: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 08/05/1976 | 47024 | Transfer out to: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 08/05/1976 | 47026 | Transfer out to: | LE | Landore | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 23/05/1976 | 08824 | Transfer out to: | SB | Shirebrook | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | on | 24/05/1976 | D1037 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 05/06/1976 | 08238 | Transfer in from: | 41J | Shirebrook | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 19/06/1976 | 03134 | Transfer out to: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 10/07/1976 | 47020 | Transfer in from: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 10/07/1976 | 47024 | Transfer in from: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 10/07/1976 | 47026 | Transfer in from: | LE | Landore | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 2w/e | 10/07/1976 | 25169 | Transfer out to: | SP | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | on | 10/08/1976 | D1021 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | on | 02/09/1976 | D1051 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | on | 17/09/1976 | D1033 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | on | 04/10/1976 | D1001 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | on | 06/10/1976 | D1028 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 3w/e | 09/10/1976 | 25063 | Transfer in from: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | 3w/e | 09/10/1976 | 46011 | Transfer in from: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | 3w/e | 09/10/1976 | 46012 | Transfer in from: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | 3w/e | 09/10/1976 | 46013 | Transfer in from: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | 3w/e | 09/10/1976 | 46014 | Transfer in from: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | 3w/e | 09/10/1976 | 46015 | Transfer in from: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | 3w/e | 09/10/1976 | 46016 | Transfer in from: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | 3w/e | 09/10/1976 | 46017 | Transfer in from: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | 3w/e | 09/10/1976 | 50032 | Transfer in from: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | 3w/e | 09/10/1976 | 50033 | Transfer in from: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 3w/e | 09/10/1976 | 25227 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 3w/e | 09/10/1976 | 47020 | Transfer out to: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 3w/e | 09/10/1976 | 47024 | Transfer out to: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | on | 12/10/1976 | D1068 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | on | 01/11/1976 | D1036 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | on | 02/11/1976 | D1072 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | on | 04/11/1976 | D1065 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | on | 10/11/1976 | D1009 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 13/11/1976 | 08091 | Transfer in from: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 13/11/1976 | 08238 | Transfer out to: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | on | 15/11/1976 | D1053 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | on | 16/11/1976 | D1005 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | on | 25/11/1976 | D1054 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 12/1976 | 08140 | Transfer out to: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | on | 07/12/1976 | D1071 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 11/12/1976 | 47020 | Transfer in from: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 11/12/1976 | 47024 | Transfer in from: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 11/12/1976 | 50025 | Transfer in from: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 11/12/1976 | 50029 | Transfer in from: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 11/12/1976 | 50030 | Transfer in from: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 11/12/1976 | 50035 | Transfer in from: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 2w/e | 11/12/1976 | 25063 | Transfer out to: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 2w/e | 11/12/1976 | 25220 | Transfer out to: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | on | 13/12/1976 | D1015 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | on | 15/12/1976 | D1056 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | on | 30/12/1976 | D1070 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | m/e | 01/1977 | 46018 | Transfer in from: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 01/1977 | 47138 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 01/1977 | 47143 | Transfer in from: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 01/1977 | 47144 | Transfer in from: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 01/1977 | 47145 | Transfer in from: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | on | 18/01/1977 | D1022 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | on | 24/01/1977 | D1058 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | m/e | 02/1977 | 46019 | Transfer in from: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | m/e | 02/1977 | 46020 | Transfer in from: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 02/1977 | 47128 | Transfer in from: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 02/1977 | 47140 | Transfer in from: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 02/1977 | 47142 | Transfer in from: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 02/1977 | 47159 | Transfer in from: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | on | 23/02/1977 | D1041 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | on | 28/02/1977 | D1010 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | on | 28/02/1977 | D1013 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | on | 28/02/1977 | D1023 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | on | 28/02/1977 | D1048 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | m/e | 04/1977 | 50046 | Transfer in from: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | m/e | 04/1977 | 50047 | Transfer in from: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | m/e | 04/1977 | 50048 | Transfer in from: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | m/e | 04/1977 | 50049 | Transfer in from: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | m/e | 05/1977 | 25155 | Transfer in from: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | m/e | 05/1977 | 46021 | Transfer in from: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | m/e | 05/1977 | 46022 | Transfer in from: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | m/e | 05/1977 | 46023 | Transfer in from: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | m/e | 05/1977 | 46024 | Transfer in from: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | m/e | 05/1977 | 46025 | Transfer in from: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | m/e | 05/1977 | 46026 | Transfer in from: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | m/e | 05/1977 | 46028 | Transfer in from: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | m/e | 05/1977 | 50037 | Transfer in from: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | m/e | 05/1977 | 50038 | Transfer in from: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | m/e | 10/1977 | 46005 | To Store | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 10/1977 | 08489 | Transfer out to: | SW | Swindon | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 10/1977 | 47143 | Transfer out to: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 10/1977 | 47144 | Transfer out to: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 10/1977 | 47145 | Transfer out to: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 10/1977 | 47159 | Transfer out to: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 3w/e | 26/11/1977 | 47140 | Transfer out to: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 3w/e | 26/11/1977 | 47142 | Transfer out to: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 19/02/1978 | 37267 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 3w/e | 25/02/1978 | 08576 | Transfer in from: | BZ | St Blazey | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 3w/e | 25/02/1978 | 37142 | Transfer in from: | 87A | Landore | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 3w/e | 25/02/1978 | 08091 | Transfer out to: | BZ | St Blazey | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 3w/e | 25/02/1978 | 47138 | Transfer out to: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 03/1978 | 47128 | Transfer out to: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 2w/e | 12/03/1978 | 25206 | Transfer in from: | LO | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 2w/e | 12/03/1978 | 25207 | Transfer in from: | LO | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 2w/e | 12/03/1978 | 25216 | Transfer out to: | CD | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 2w/e | 12/03/1978 | 25217 | Transfer out to: | CD | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 16/04/1978 | 46024 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 05/10/1978 | 46003 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | m/e | 11/1978 | 46027 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | m/e | 11/1978 | 50038 | Transfer in from: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 11/1978 | 47029 | Transfer out to: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 11/1978 | 47030 | Transfer out to: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 11/1978 | 47033 | Transfer out to: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | m/e | 11/1978 | 50038 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 03/03/1979 | 47015 | Transfer in from: | D02 | Birmingham Division | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 27/07/1980 | 46012 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 05/10/1980 | 46001 | To Store | ||||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 05/10/1980 | 25052 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 05/10/1980 | 25223 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 05/10/1980 | 25225 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 01/12/1980 | 25155 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 14/12/1980 | 46002 | Transfer out to: | 98W | |||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 14/12/1980 | 46006 | Transfer out to: | 98W | |||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 14/12/1980 | 46007 | Transfer out to: | 98W | |||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 14/12/1980 | 46010 | Transfer out to: | 98W | |||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 14/12/1980 | 46017 | Transfer out to: | 98W | |||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 14/12/1980 | 46018 | Transfer out to: | 98W | |||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 14/12/1980 | 46021 | Transfer out to: | 98W | |||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 14/12/1980 | 46022 | Transfer out to: | 98W | |||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 14/12/1980 | 46025 | Transfer out to: | 98W | |||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 14/12/1980 | 46015 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 14/12/1980 | 46019 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 14/12/1980 | 46020 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 06/09/1981 | 47557 | Transfer out to: | TO | Toton | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 11/10/1981 | 46008 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 11/1981 | 08479 | Transfer in from: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 11/1981 | 08668 | Transfer in from: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 11/1981 | 08795 | Transfer in from: | SW | Swindon | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 11/1981 | 08937 | Transfer in from: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 11/1981 | 08953 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 11/1981 | 08955 | Transfer in from: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 11/1981 | 08937 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 01/11/1981 | 46013 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 08/08/1982 | 25170 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 19/06/1983 | 25215 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 26/06/1983 | 46004 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 01/10/1983 | 97401 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 01/11/1983 | 46023 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 31/12/1983 | 46016 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 06/05/1984 | 46014 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 27/05/1984 | 46028 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 12/11/1984 | 25207 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 25/11/1984 | 46011 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 25/11/1984 | 46026 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 25/11/1984 | 46027 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 02/09/1985 | 25080 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 16/02/1986 | 08488 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 21/03/1986 | 25206 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 08/05/1986 | 25224 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | on | 23/02/1987 | 50011 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 11/05/1987 | 47015 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | on | 16/07/1987 | 50006 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 37142 | Transfer out to: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 47556 | Transfer out to: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 47558 | Transfer out to: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 47559 | Transfer out to: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 50036 | Transfer out to: | OC | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 50037 | Transfer out to: | OC | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 50038 | Transfer out to: | OC | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 20/11/1987 | 08394 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | on | 13/12/1987 | 50014 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | on | 13/03/1988 | 50013 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | on | 13/04/1988 | 50047 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 47477 | Transfer in from: | LE | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 47526 | Transfer in from: | YK | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 47542 | Transfer in from: | SF | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 50022 | Transfer in from: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 47560 | Transfer out to: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 47662 | Transfer out to: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 50022 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | on | 05/06/1988 | 50021 | Transfer in from: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | on | 05/06/1988 | 50021 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | on | 20/09/1988 | 50022 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | on | 27/09/1988 | 50010 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | on | 16/01/1989 | 50012 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 03/04/1989 | 47542 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | on | 14/08/1989 | 50025 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | on | 17/04/1990 | 50021 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | on | 22/06/1990 | 50004 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | on | 29/06/1990 | 50034 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | on | 10/07/1990 | 50016 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | on | 27/07/1990 | 50020 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | on | 01/08/1990 | 50035 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | on | 19/09/1990 | 50019 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | on | 15/10/1990 | 50023 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | on | 15/10/1990 | 50032 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | on | 11/12/1990 | 50005 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | on | 11/12/1990 | 50026 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | on | 11/12/1990 | 50045 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | on | 11/01/1991 | 50009 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | on | 01/02/1991 | 50024 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | on | 01/02/1991 | 50028 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | on | 19/04/1991 | 50001 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | on | 15/07/1991 | 50003 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | on | 15/07/1991 | 50048 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | on | 22/07/1991 | 50018 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | on | 23/07/1991 | 50027 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | on | 01/08/1991 | 50031 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | on | 01/08/1991 | 50049 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | on | 01/09/1991 | 50017 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | on | 09/09/1991 | 50002 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 08/11/1991 | 08479 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | on | 25/03/1992 | 50029 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | on | 25/03/1992 | 50046 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | on | 08/04/1992 | 50030 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | on | 05/06/1992 | 50008 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | on | 05/06/1992 | 50015 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 28/10/1992 | 47477 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 05/02/1993 | 08945 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 10/09/1993 | 08895 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 23/12/1993 | 08937 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | on | 01/03/1994 | 50050 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | on | 25/03/1994 | 50033 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | on | 31/03/1994 | 50007 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 02/04/1997 | 08668 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 01/01/2003 | 47597 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 01/04/2005 | 37421 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/04/2006 | 08576 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 31/10/2007 | 47526 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/09/2008 | 08955 | Condemned |