Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 4 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 1230 Week
» 20875 Month
» 55517 Year
» 1277082 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Leamington


Type Class Wheels Period Date Number Event Code Depot Length of Stay Notes
Steam 5100 2-6-2T 4w/e 01/12/1945 5137 Transfer in from: 54 Chester West    
Steam 5101 2-6-2T 4w/e 29/11/1947 5185 Transfer in from:        
Steam 72xx 2-8-2T 4w/e 24/01/1948 7208 Transfer in from:        
Steam 72xx 2-8-2T 4w/e 24/01/1948 7237 Transfer in from:        
Steam 72xx 2-8-2T 4w/e 10/07/1948 7247 Transfer in from:        
Steam 72xx 2-8-2T 4w/e 30/10/1948 7247 Transfer out to: NPT Ebbw Junction (Newport)    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT m/e 31/12/1949 8454 1st Allocation        
Steam Hall 4-6-0 4w/e 31/12/1950 6924 Transfer in from:        
Steam Hall 4-6-0 4w/e 28/02/1951 5923 Transfer in from:        
Steam Hall 4-6-0 4w/e 28/02/1951 5966 Transfer in from:        
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 28/02/1951 90685 Transfer in from: 84K Chester West    
Steam Grange 4-6-0 3w/e 19/05/1951 6835 Transfer in from:        
Steam Hall 4-6-0 3w/e 19/05/1951 5923 Transfer out to: 86E Severn Tunnel Junction    
Steam 5100 2-6-2T 6w/e 30/06/1951 5137 Transfer out to: 84C Banbury    
Steam Grange 4-6-0 6w/e 30/06/1951 6835 Transfer out to: 84C Banbury    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 6w/e 30/06/1951 90685 Transfer out to: 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport)    
Steam Hall 4-6-0 m/e 31/07/1951 4987 Transfer in from:        
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 31/08/1951 8454 Transfer out to: 87B Duffryn Yard    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 30/09/1951 3619 Transfer in from: TYS Tyseley    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 30/09/1951 3624 Transfer in from:        
Steam 72xx 2-8-2T 4w/e 31/01/1952 7208 Transfer out to: 84B Oxley    
Steam 5101 2-6-2T 4w/e 30/04/1952 4102 Transfer in from: 84C Banbury    
Steam 5101 2-6-2T 3w/e 17/05/1952 4102 Transfer out to: 84C Banbury    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T w/e 06/09/1952 6624 Transfer in from: 84G Shrewsbury    
Steam 72xx 2-8-2T w/e 06/09/1952 7237 Transfer out to: 86E Severn Tunnel Junction    
Steam Hall 4-6-0 4w/e 01/11/1952 4987 Transfer out to: 84C Banbury    
Steam Hall 4-6-0 4w/e 01/11/1952 5966 Transfer out to: 84B Oxley    
Steam Hall 4-6-0 4w/e 01/11/1952 6924 Transfer out to: 85B Gloucester Horton Road    
Steam 5101 2-6-2T 4w/e 21/02/1953 5184 Transfer in from:        
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 03/10/1953 90466 Transfer in from: 84G Shrewsbury    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 03/10/1953 90563 Transfer in from: 84G Shrewsbury    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 27/03/1954 90010 Transfer in from: 84G Shrewsbury    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 27/03/1954 90466 Transfer out to: 84G Shrewsbury    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 24/04/1954 90483 Transfer in from: 84G Shrewsbury    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 24/04/1954 90563 Transfer out to: 84G Shrewsbury    
Steam 5101 2-6-2T 4w/e 09/10/1954 4118 Transfer in from: OXF Oxford    
Steam 5101 2-6-2T 4w/e 09/10/1954 4171 Transfer in from: 84E Tyseley    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 8w/e 26/03/1955 6633 Transfer in from:        
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 16/07/1955 6633 Transfer out to: 84J Croes Newydd    
Steam 5101 2-6-2T m/e 16/06/1956 5184 Transfer out to: 83G Penzance    
Steam 5101 2-6-2T 4w/e 14/07/1956 5161 Transfer in from: 83G Penzance    
Steam 5101 2-6-2T 4w/e 14/07/1956 5184 Transfer in from: 83G Penzance    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 14/07/1956 90261 Transfer in from: 84G Shrewsbury    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 14/07/1956 90010 Transfer out to: 84G Shrewsbury    
Steam 5101 2-6-2T m/e 04/1957 5161 Condemned      
Steam 58xx 0-4-2T 8w/e 20/04/1957 5813 Transfer in from: BRD Bristol Bath Road    
Steam 58xx 0-4-2T 8w/e 20/04/1957 5815 Transfer in from:        
Steam 5101 2-6-2T 4w/e 13/07/1957 5101 Transfer in from:        
Steam 58xx 0-4-2T m/e 11/1957 5813 Condemned      
Steam 5101 2-6-2T 4w/e 02/11/1957 4128 Transfer in from: 84K Chester West    
Steam 5101 2-6-2T 4w/e 02/11/1957 5198 Transfer in from: TYS Tyseley    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 02/11/1957 6624 Transfer out to: 88A Cardiff Cathays    
Steam 5101 2-6-2T 4w/e 30/11/1957 4103 Transfer in from: 84A Stafford Road    
Steam 61xx 2-6-2T 4w/e 30/11/1957 6134 Transfer in from: 84E Tyseley    
Steam Hall 4-6-0 4w/e 25/01/1958 4933 Transfer in from: 85A Worcester    
Steam 61xx 2-6-2T 4w/e 25/01/1958 6134 Transfer out to: 86E Severn Tunnel Junction    
Steam 58xx 0-4-2T 4w/e 22/02/1958 5815 Transfer out to: 84C Banbury    
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 4w/e 14/06/1958 82007 Transfer in from: 84H Wellington    
Steam 5101 2-6-2T 4w/e 14/06/1958 4128 Transfer out to: 83B Taunton    
Steam 5101 2-6-2T 4w/e 14/06/1958 5184 Transfer out to: 83B Taunton    
Steam 5101 2-6-2T 4w/e 14/06/1958 5185 Transfer out to: 83B Taunton    
Steam 5101 2-6-2T 4w/e 09/08/1958 5198 Transfer out to: 85B Gloucester Horton Road    
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 4w/e 09/08/1958 82007 Transfer out to: 84K Wrexham Rhosddu    
Steam Hall 4-6-0 4w/e 06/09/1958 4933 Transfer out to: 82D Westbury    
Steam 5101 2-6-2T 4w/e 04/10/1958 5184 Transfer in from: 83B Taunton    
Steam 5101 2-6-2T 4w/e 01/11/1958 4162 Transfer in from: 84E Tyseley    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 29/11/1958 41227 Transfer in from: 2A Rugby    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 29/11/1958 41228 Transfer in from: 2A Rugby    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 29/11/1958 41285 Transfer in from: 2A Rugby    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 29/11/1958 42566 Transfer in from: 2A Rugby    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 20/12/1958 42566 Transfer out to: 2A Rugby    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 21/02/1959 42566 Transfer in from: 2A Rugby    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 08/08/1959 41285 Transfer out to: 84K Wrexham Rhosddu    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T w/e 29/08/1959 41227 Transfer out to: 91W To Western Region / GWR    
Steam 5101 2-6-2T 4w/e 05/09/1959 4103 Transfer out to: 81F Oxford    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 05/09/1959 90261 Transfer out to: 84C Banbury    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 05/09/1959 90483 Transfer out to: 84C Banbury    
Steam 5101 2-6-2T 4w/e 26/12/1959 5194 Transfer in from: 85B Gloucester Horton Road    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 26/12/1959 9614 Transfer in from: TYS Tyseley    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 26/12/1959 9733 Transfer in from:        
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 30/01/1960 41285 Transfer in from: 84K Wrexham Rhosddu    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 30/01/1960 9614 Transfer out to: 84E Tyseley    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 30/01/1960 9733 Transfer out to: 84E Tyseley    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T w/e 06/02/1960 41228 Transfer out to: 2A Rugby    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T w/e 19/03/1960 41285 Transfer out to: 2A Rugby    
Steam 5101 2-6-2T 4w/e 26/03/1960 5177 Transfer in from: 85B Gloucester Horton Road    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T w/e 28/05/1960 41285 Transfer in from: 2A Rugby    
Steam 5101 2-6-2T m/e 07/1960 4162 Condemned      
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 08/10/1960 3624 Transfer out to: 87H Neyland    
Steam 2251 0-6-0 4w/e 03/12/1960 2211 Transfer in from: 84E Tyseley    
Steam 2251 0-6-0 4w/e 03/12/1960 2257 Transfer in from: 84E Tyseley    
Steam 2251 0-6-0 4w/e 03/12/1960 2267 Transfer in from: 84E Tyseley    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 03/12/1960 40085 Transfer in from: 84G Kidderminster    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 03/12/1960 41204 Transfer in from: 84H Wellington    
Steam 5101 2-6-2T 4w/e 03/12/1960 4176 Transfer in from: 83C Exeter    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 31/12/1960 42566 Transfer out to: 87E Landore    
Steam 2251 0-6-0 4w/e 28/01/1961 3219 Transfer in from: 81D Reading (W.R.)    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 25/02/1961 42566 Transfer in from: 87E Landore    
Steam 2251 0-6-0 4w/e 25/02/1961 3219 Transfer out to: 81D Reading (W.R.)    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 25/03/1961 41204 Transfer out to: 84H Wellington    
Steam 5101 2-6-2T m/e 04/1961 5194 Condemned      
Steam 3P 2-6-2T w/e 29/04/1961 40085 Transfer out to: 6A Chester (Midland)    
Steam 5101 2-6-2T m/e 05/1961 5177 Condemned      
Steam 5101 2-6-2T 4w/e 20/05/1961 4125 Transfer in from: 81F Oxford    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 12/08/1961 44272 Transfer in from: 22B Gloucester Barnwood    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 12/08/1961 6618 Transfer in from: 84E Tyseley    
Steam 5101 2-6-2T 4w/e 12/08/1961 4125 Transfer out to: 84E Tyseley    
Steam 2P 4-4-0 4w/e 09/09/1961 40537 Transfer in from: 82E Bristol Barrow Road    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 09/09/1961 44272 Transfer out to: 85C Gloucester Barnwood    
Steam 2251 0-6-0 4w/e 07/10/1961 2201 Transfer in from: 89B Croes Newydd    
Steam 2251 0-6-0 4w/e 07/10/1961 2210 Transfer in from: 89B Croes Newydd    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 07/10/1961 41231 Transfer in from: 84H Wellington    
Steam 2251 0-6-0 m/e 11/1961 2267 Condemned      
Steam 5101 2-6-2T 4w/e 04/11/1961 5192 Transfer in from: 84E Tyseley    
Steam 5101 2-6-2T 4w/e 27/01/1962 4125 Transfer in from: 84E Tyseley    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 24/02/1962 6671 Transfer in from: 85A Worcester    
Steam 2251 0-6-0 4w/e 24/02/1962 2201 Transfer out to: 81E Didcot    
Steam 2P 4-4-0 4w/e 24/03/1962 40537 Transfer out to: 82G Templecombe (S&D)    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 21/04/1962 6644 Transfer in from: 84F Stourbridge Junction    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 19/05/1962 6663 Transfer in from: 84F Stourbridge Junction    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 19/05/1962 3619 Transfer out to: 84G Kidderminster    
Steam 5101 2-6-2T 4w/e 19/05/1962 5192 Transfer out to: 84F Stourbridge Junction    
Steam 2251 0-6-0 4w/e 16/06/1962 3217 Transfer in from: 84C Banbury    
Steam 2251 0-6-0 4w/e 14/07/1962 2257 Transfer out to: 89B Croes Newydd    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 18/08/1962 42566 Transfer out to: 1A Willesden    
Steam 5101 2-6-2T m/e 09/1962 4118 Condemned      
Steam 5101 2-6-2T 4w/e 08/09/1962 4178 Transfer in from: 84F Stourbridge Junction    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 4w/e 08/09/1962 75000 Transfer in from: 82E Bristol Barrow Road    
Steam 5101 2-6-2T 4w/e 08/09/1962 5184 Transfer out to: 85B Gloucester Horton Road    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 08/09/1962 6644 Transfer out to: 84B Oxley    
Steam 5101 2-6-2T 4w/e 06/10/1962 4120 Transfer in from: 84E Tyseley    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 06/10/1962 5640 Transfer in from: 82B St Philips Marsh    
Steam 5101 2-6-2T 4w/e 03/11/1962 4133 Transfer in from: 84E Tyseley    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 2w/e 17/11/1962 48412 Transfer in from: 81A Old Oak Common    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 2w/e 17/11/1962 5658 Transfer in from: 84E Tyseley    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 2w/e 17/11/1962 6668 Transfer in from: 84E Tyseley    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 23/03/1963 48412 Transfer out to: 84E Tyseley    
Steam 5101 2-6-2T m/e 06/1963 5101 Condemned      
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T m/e 06/1963 5640 Condemned      
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T m/e 06/1963 6663 Condemned      
Steam 5101 2-6-2T w/e 22/06/1963 4151 Transfer in from: 86E Severn Tunnel Junction    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 29/06/1963 6639 Transfer in from: 88G Llantrisant    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T w/e 20/07/1963 41272 Transfer in from: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T w/e 20/07/1963 6639 Transfer in from: 84D Leamington    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T w/e 20/07/1963 41285 Transfer out to: 89D Oswestry    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T w/e 20/07/1963 6639 Transfer out to: 84D Leamington    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T w/e 14/09/1963 80072 Transfer in from: 87D Swansea East Dock    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 14/09/1963 75000 Transfer out to: 83E Yeovil Town    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T m/e 10/1963 6639 Condemned      
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T m/e 11/1963 6618 Condemned      
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T w/e 02/11/1963 6644 Transfer in from: 84B Oxley    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T w/e 01/02/1964 41241 Transfer in from: 84H Wellington    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T w/e 08/02/1964 41232 Transfer in from: 84H Wellington    
Steam 43xx 2-6-0 w/e 22/02/1964 6364 Transfer in from: 84G Kidderminster    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T w/e 07/03/1964 41204 Transfer in from: 5A Crewe North    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T m/e 05/1964 41231 Condemned      
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T w/e 13/06/1964 41204 Transfer out to: 5A Crewe North    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T w/e 13/06/1964 41241 Transfer out to: 2M Wellington    
Steam 43xx 2-6-0 w/e 08/08/1964 6364 Transfer out to: 2P Kidderminster    
Steam 5101 2-6-2T w/e 15/08/1964 5153 Transfer in from: 84G Kidderminster    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T w/e 12/09/1964 6697 Transfer in from: 88B Radyr    
Steam 5101 2-6-2T m/e 10/1964 4133 Condemned      
Steam 5101 2-6-2T m/e 10/1964 4171 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 w/e 10/10/1964 73066 Transfer in from: 14A Cricklewood East    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 w/e 10/10/1964 73069 Transfer in from: 14A Cricklewood East    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 w/e 10/10/1964 73156 Transfer in from: 14A Cricklewood East    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 24/10/1964 46428 Transfer in from: 21C Bushbury    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 24/10/1964 46442 Transfer in from: 6C Croes Newydd    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 24/10/1964 46457 Transfer in from: 6A Chester (Midland)    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 24/10/1964 46470 Transfer in from: 6A Chester (Midland)    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 24/10/1964 46505 Transfer in from: 2E Saltley    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 w/e 24/10/1964 73026 Transfer in from: 84G Shrewsbury    
Steam 5101 2-6-2T w/e 24/10/1964 4178 Transfer out to: 2A Tyseley    
Steam 2251 0-6-0 m/e 11/1964 2211 Condemned      
Steam 2251 0-6-0 m/e 11/1964 3217 Condemned      
Steam 5101 2-6-2T m/e 11/1964 4120 Condemned      
Steam 5101 2-6-2T m/e 11/1964 5153 Condemned      
Steam 2251 0-6-0 w/e 14/11/1964 2210 Transfer out to: 2D Banbury    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T w/e 14/11/1964 41232 Transfer out to: 6G Llandudno Junction    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T w/e 14/11/1964 41272 Transfer out to: 6G Llandudno Junction    
Steam 5101 2-6-2T w/e 06/03/1965 4125 Transfer out to: 2A Tyseley    
Steam 5101 2-6-2T w/e 13/03/1965 4151 Transfer out to: 2C Stourbridge Junction    
Steam 5101 2-6-2T w/e 17/04/1965 4176 Transfer out to: 2B Oxley    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 19/06/1965 46428 Transfer out to: 2A Tyseley    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 19/06/1965 46442 Transfer out to: 2A Tyseley    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 19/06/1965 46457 Transfer out to: 2A Tyseley    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 19/06/1965 46470 Transfer out to: 2A Tyseley    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 19/06/1965 46505 Transfer out to: 2E Saltley    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T w/e 19/06/1965 6644 Transfer out to: 2A Tyseley    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T w/e 19/06/1965 6671 Transfer out to: 2D Banbury    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T w/e 19/06/1965 6697 Transfer out to: 2D Banbury    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 w/e 19/06/1965 73026 Transfer out to: 2A Tyseley    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 w/e 19/06/1965 73066 Transfer out to: 2A Tyseley    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 w/e 19/06/1965 73069 Transfer out to: 2A Tyseley    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 w/e 19/06/1965 73156 Transfer out to: 2A Tyseley    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T w/e 19/06/1965 80072 Transfer out to: 6D Shrewsbury    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T w/e 06/11/1965 6668 Transfer out to: 6C Croes Newydd    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T w/e 13/11/1965 5658 Condemned