Depot: Llandudno Junction
Type | Class | Wheels | Period | Date | Number | Event | Code | Depot | Length of Stay | Notes |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | 1P | 2-4-2T | 4w/e | 02/11/1935 | 6701 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Cauliflowers | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/11/1935 | 8521 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Cauliflowers | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/11/1935 | 8552 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Cauliflowers | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/11/1935 | 8616 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Cauliflowers | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/11/1935 | 8618 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Precursor | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 30/11/1935 | 5283 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Precursor | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 30/11/1935 | 5287 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 1P | 2-4-2T | 4w/e | 30/11/1935 | 6641 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | George V | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | 25379 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 19" Goods | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | 8727 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Precursor | 4-4-0 | m/e | 03/1936 | 25283 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Precursor | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 11/04/1936 | 5293 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Precursor | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 11/04/1936 | 5294 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | George V | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 11/04/1936 | 5350 | Transfer in from: | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | ||
Steam | 1P | 2-4-2T | 4w/e | 11/04/1936 | 6628 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 11/04/1936 | 79 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 11/04/1936 | 82 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 11/04/1936 | 83 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | George V | 4-4-0 | m/e | 08/1936 | 25379 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 19" Goods | 4-6-0 | m/e | 08/1936 | 8727 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Precursor | 4-4-0 | m/e | 05/1937 | 25294 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Precursor | 4-4-0 | m/e | 06/1937 | 25287 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 08/04/1939 | 2984 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | Precursor | 4-4-0 | m/e | 06/1939 | 25293 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 20/04/1940 | 2951 | Transfer in from: | BHD | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 20/04/1940 | 2954 | Transfer in from: | BHD | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 20/04/1940 | 2984 | Transfer out to: | 7B | Bangor | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 17/08/1940 | 2952 | Transfer in from: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 26/10/1940 | 2951 | Transfer out to: | 7B | Bangor | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 26/10/1940 | 2952 | Transfer out to: | 7B | Bangor | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 26/10/1940 | 2954 | Transfer out to: | 7B | Bangor | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 08/07/1944 | 2945 | Transfer in from: | 7B | Bangor | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 09/09/1944 | 2945 | Transfer out to: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | Cauliflowers | 0-6-0 | m/e | 05/1945 | 28552 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 14/07/1945 | 2976 | Transfer in from: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 22/06/1946 | 1157 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 22/06/1946 | 1167 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Cauliflowers | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/06/1946 | 28529 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/06/1946 | 5303 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 1P | 2-4-2T | m/e | 10/1946 | 6641 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 12/10/1946 | 2971 | Transfer in from: | BHD | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 28/06/1947 | 2954 | Transfer in from: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 13/09/1947 | 2976 | Transfer out to: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1086 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1093 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1118 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1119 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1150 | Snapshot | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1156 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1157 | Snapshot | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1161 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1167 | Snapshot | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 123 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 134 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 137 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 209 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3877 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 396 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4389 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4860 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4911 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5112 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 524 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5253 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5301 | Snapshot | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5303 | Snapshot | 7A | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5303 | Snapshot | 7A | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5346 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5370 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 658 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 1P | 2-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 6628 | Snapshot | 10E | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | ||
Steam | 1P | 2-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 6681 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 1P | 2-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 6701 | Snapshot | 7D | Rhyl | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 671 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 1P | 2-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 6747 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 675 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 79 | Snapshot | 14B | Kentish Town | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 82 | Snapshot | 19B | Sheffield Millhouses | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 83 | Snapshot | 7B | Bangor | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 87 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 925 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 936 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 17/01/1948 | 130 | Transfer in from: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 1P | 2-4-2T | w/e | 17/01/1948 | 6658 | Transfer in from: | 7D | Rhyl | ||
Steam | 1P | 2-4-2T | w/e | 17/01/1948 | 6681 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 1P | 2-4-2T | on | 07/02/1948 | 6747 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 21/02/1948 | 5292 | Transfer in from: | 4A | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | Coal Tank | 0-6-2T | w/e | 21/02/1948 | 58906 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 21/02/1948 | 5112 | Transfer out to: | 4A | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 08/05/1948 | 40133 | Transfer in from: | 7B | Bangor | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | w/e | 08/05/1948 | 646 | Transfer in from: | 7D | Rhyl | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 08/05/1948 | 396 | Transfer out to: | 7D | Rhyl | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 08/05/1948 | 4911 | Transfer out to: | 7C | Holyhead | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | w/e | 08/05/1948 | 671 | Transfer out to: | 7D | Rhyl | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | w/e | 08/05/1948 | 675 | Transfer out to: | 7D | Rhyl | ||
Steam | Cauliflowers | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/05/1948 | 28529 | Transfer out to: | 7D | Rhyl | ||
Steam | George V | 4-4-0 | on | 22/05/1948 | 25350 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 29/05/1948 | 209 | Transfer in from: | 7A | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 29/05/1948 | 209 | Transfer out to: | 7A | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 1114 | Transfer in from: | 7C | Holyhead | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 1123 | Transfer in from: | 7C | Holyhead | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 1124 | Transfer in from: | 7C | Holyhead | ||
Steam | George V | 4-4-0 | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 25332 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 2965 | Transfer in from: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 45045 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 4840 | Transfer in from: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 45253 | Transfer out to: | 14B | Kentish Town | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 26/06/1948 | 44740 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 26/06/1948 | 45045 | Transfer out to: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | Cauliflowers | 0-6-0 | m/e | 07/1948 | 28618 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | George V | 4-4-0 | w/e | 03/07/1948 | 25332 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/07/1948 | 45303 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/07/1948 | 4860 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 10/07/1948 | 524 | Transfer out to: | 7B | Bangor | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 17/07/1948 | 7394 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 17/07/1948 | 2965 | Transfer out to: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | Coal Tank | 0-6-2T | w/e | 17/07/1948 | 58906 | Transfer out to: | 7B | Bangor | ||
Steam | Cauliflowers | 0-6-0 | w/e | 21/08/1948 | 28335 | Transfer in from: | 7D | Rhyl | ||
Steam | Cauliflowers | 0-6-0 | w/e | 21/08/1948 | 28616 | Transfer out to: | 3E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 28/08/1948 | 134 | Transfer out to: | 7B | Bangor | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 02/10/1948 | 40087 | Transfer out to: | 7B | Bangor | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/10/1948 | 4840 | Transfer out to: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 1P | 2-4-2T | w/e | 23/10/1948 | 6604 | Transfer in from: | 7B | Bangor | ||
Steam | 1P | 2-4-2T | w/e | 30/10/1948 | 46687 | Transfer in from: | 7B | Bangor | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 42666 | Transfer in from: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 5042 | Transfer in from: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 5301 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | w/e | 07/05/1949 | 40646 | Transfer out to: | 7D | Rhyl | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 28/05/1949 | 45095 | Transfer in from: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 25/06/1949 | 42984 | Transfer in from: | 7B | Bangor | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 25/06/1949 | 40002 | Transfer out to: | 2E | Warwick | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 02/07/1949 | 40483 | Transfer in from: | 2C | Northampton | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | w/e | 02/07/1949 | 40658 | Transfer out to: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 40483 | Transfer in from: | 7A | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 40483 | Transfer out to: | 7A | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | m/e | 08/1949 | 40483 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | w/e | 27/08/1949 | 41232 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Cauliflowers | 0-6-0 | m/e | 09/1949 | 58399 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 10/09/1949 | 42666 | Transfer out to: | 2C | Northampton | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 42954 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 42971 | Transfer out to: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 42984 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 08/10/1949 | 44808 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | w/e | 22/10/1949 | 40900 | Transfer in from: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 03/12/1949 | 44808 | Transfer out to: | 7C | Holyhead | ||
Steam | 1P | 2-4-2T | w/e | 10/12/1949 | 46658 | Transfer out to: | 10E | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 5w/e | 24/12/1949 | 40900 | Transfer out to: | 19G | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 5w/e | 24/12/1949 | 40936 | Transfer out to: | LIV | Brunswick | ||
Steam | 1P | 2-4-2T | w/e | 24/12/1949 | 46687 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | w/e | 10/06/1950 | 41118 | Transfer out to: | 8E | Brunswick | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/06/1950 | 45346 | Transfer out to: | 7C | Holyhead | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 44971 | Transfer in from: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 45241 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 45095 | Transfer out to: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 40124 | Transfer in from: | 7B | Bangor | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 41116 | Transfer in from: | 3E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 44808 | Transfer in from: | 7C | Holyhead | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 40124 | Transfer in from: | 7A | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 41116 | Transfer in from: | 7A | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 44808 | Transfer in from: | 7A | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 40124 | Transfer out to: | 7A | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 41116 | Transfer out to: | 7A | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 44808 | Transfer out to: | 7A | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 14/10/1950 | 40207 | Transfer in from: | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 14/10/1950 | 40209 | Transfer out to: | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 14/10/1950 | 45241 | Transfer out to: | 11A | Carnforth | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 21/10/1950 | 40095 | Transfer in from: | 19D | Heaton Mersey | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 21/10/1950 | 40208 | Transfer in from: | 2D | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 21/10/1950 | 40124 | Transfer out to: | 9F | Heaton Mersey | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 21/10/1950 | 40137 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 40095 | Transfer in from: | 7A | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 40207 | Transfer in from: | 7A | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 40208 | Transfer in from: | 7A | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | Cauliflowers | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 58398 | Transfer in from: | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 40095 | Transfer out to: | 7A | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 40207 | Transfer out to: | 7A | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 40208 | Transfer out to: | 7A | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 44941 | Transfer in from: | BA | Bricklayers Arms | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 44941 | Transfer in from: | 7A | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 44941 | Transfer out to: | 7A | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 44971 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 41173 | Transfer in from: | LIV | Brunswick | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | m/e | 31/12/1950 | 41116 | Transfer out to: | 8E | Brunswick | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 27/01/1951 | 40103 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | Cauliflowers | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/01/1951 | 58398 | Transfer out to: | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 40103 | Transfer out to: | 5F | Uttoxeter | ||
Steam | Cauliflowers | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/02/1951 | 58426 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | Cauliflowers | 0-6-0 | w/e | 24/02/1951 | 58364 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Cauliflowers | 0-6-0 | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 58421 | Transfer in from: | 12D | Workington | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | w/e | 03/03/1951 | 41055 | Transfer in from: | 19G | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | w/e | 03/03/1951 | 41111 | Transfer in from: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | w/e | 03/03/1951 | 41161 | Transfer out to: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | w/e | 03/03/1951 | 41173 | Transfer out to: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 41055 | Transfer in from: | 7A | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 41111 | Transfer in from: | 7A | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 41055 | Transfer out to: | 7A | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 41111 | Transfer out to: | 7A | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 40377 | Transfer in from: | 7D | Rhyl | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 45292 | Transfer out to: | 7C | Holyhead | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 40377 | Transfer in from: | 7A | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 40377 | Transfer out to: | 7A | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 40143 | Transfer in from: | 7B | Bangor | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 45247 | Transfer in from: | 7C | Holyhead | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 40377 | Transfer out to: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 40143 | Transfer in from: | 7A | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 45247 | Transfer in from: | 7A | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 40143 | Transfer out to: | 7A | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 45247 | Transfer out to: | 7A | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 45370 | Transfer out to: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 40143 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 45255 | Transfer in from: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 90423 | Transfer in from: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 45255 | Transfer out to: | 6H | Bangor | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 90423 | Transfer out to: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | Cauliflowers | 0-6-0 | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 58375 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 41156 | Transfer out to: | 21B | Bournville | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 5w/e | 21/06/1952 | 41055 | Transfer out to: | 35C | Spital Bridge | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 40122 | Transfer in from: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 40125 | Transfer in from: | 8D | Widnes | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 40324 | Transfer in from: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 40395 | Transfer in from: | 17B | Burton | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 40396 | Transfer in from: | 7D | Rhyl | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 45247 | Transfer out to: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | Cauliflowers | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 58375 | Transfer out to: | 6H | Bangor | ||
Steam | Cauliflowers | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 58426 | Transfer out to: | 6K | Rhyl | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 41055 | Transfer in from: | 35C | Spital Bridge | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 41236 | Transfer in from: | 2D | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 41237 | Transfer in from: | 2D | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 41238 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 40122 | Transfer out to: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 40125 | Transfer out to: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 40207 | Transfer out to: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 44971 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 40324 | Transfer out to: | 6K | Rhyl | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 40395 | Transfer out to: | 17D | Rowsley | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 40396 | Transfer out to: | 6K | Rhyl | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 44941 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | Cauliflowers | 0-6-0 | m/e | 11/1952 | 58421 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 40548 | Transfer in from: | 35C | Spital Bridge | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 40559 | Transfer in from: | 16B | Spital Bridge | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 45005 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 44971 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 03/01/1953 | 45005 | Transfer in from: | 6G | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 03/01/1953 | 45005 | Transfer out to: | 6G | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | m/e | 02/1953 | 41055 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 44760 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 44760 | Transfer out to: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 40086 | Transfer in from: | 5F | Uttoxeter | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 44808 | Transfer out to: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 45005 | Transfer out to: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | 1P | 2-4-2T | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 46604 | Transfer out to: | 6H | Bangor | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 75010 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 75011 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 75012 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 75013 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 75014 | Transfer in from: | 10C | Patricroft | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 45331 | Transfer in from: | 4B | Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 40377 | Transfer in from: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 75030 | Transfer in from: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 41114 | Transfer out to: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 41123 | Transfer out to: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 41124 | Transfer out to: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 41150 | Transfer out to: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 46421 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 46430 | Transfer in from: | 10B | Preston | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/09/1954 | 46421 | Transfer out to: | 8D | Widnes | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 46430 | Transfer out to: | 10B | Preston | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 43981 | Transfer in from: | 6E | Wrexham Rhosddu | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 44525 | Transfer in from: | 12D | Workington | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 43877 | Transfer out to: | 6E | Wrexham Rhosddu | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/02/1955 | 75030 | Transfer in from: | 6G | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/02/1955 | 75031 | Transfer in from: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/02/1955 | 75032 | Transfer in from: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/02/1955 | 45331 | Transfer out to: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/02/1955 | 75030 | Transfer out to: | 6G | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 8w/e | 16/07/1955 | 41086 | Transfer out to: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | m/e | 09/1955 | 40377 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 41232 | Transfer out to: | 6D | Chester Northgate | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 05/11/1955 | 40559 | Transfer out to: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 45133 | Transfer in from: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1955 | 75031 | Transfer out to: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1955 | 75032 | Transfer out to: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 09/06/1956 | 75033 | Transfer in from: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 75032 | Transfer in from: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 40086 | Transfer out to: | 6E | Wrexham Rhosddu | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 40208 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 41237 | Transfer out to: | 6D | Chester Northgate | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 15/09/1956 | 75033 | Transfer out to: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 75032 | Transfer out to: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 42601 | Transfer in from: | 3E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 44864 | Transfer in from: | 7C | Holyhead | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 44865 | Transfer in from: | 7C | Holyhead | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 45437 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 29/12/1956 | 42601 | Transfer out to: | 3E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/12/1956 | 75030 | Transfer out to: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/01/1957 | 45441 | Transfer in from: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 23/03/1957 | 40548 | Transfer out to: | 14B | Kentish Town | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 18/05/1957 | 41324 | Transfer in from: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 18/05/1957 | 41236 | Transfer out to: | 6E | Wrexham Rhosddu | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/05/1957 | 75010 | Transfer out to: | 6H | Bangor | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/05/1957 | 75012 | Transfer out to: | 6H | Bangor | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 16/06/1957 | 40925 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 16/06/1957 | 41093 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 16/06/1957 | 41119 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 40580 | Transfer in from: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 40675 | Transfer in from: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 41120 | Transfer in from: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 41164 | Transfer in from: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 75010 | Transfer in from: | 6H | Bangor | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 75012 | Transfer in from: | 6H | Bangor | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 75031 | Transfer in from: | 6H | Bangor | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 41324 | Transfer out to: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 45133 | Transfer out to: | 10C | Patricroft | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 45437 | Transfer out to: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 45441 | Transfer out to: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 07/09/1957 | 41324 | Transfer in from: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 41235 | Transfer in from: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 44935 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 45403 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 41111 | Transfer out to: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 41324 | Transfer out to: | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 75014 | Transfer out to: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 75031 | Transfer out to: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 43615 | Transfer in from: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 75032 | Transfer in from: | 6H | Bangor | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 75034 | Transfer in from: | 6H | Bangor | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 75035 | Transfer in from: | 6H | Bangor | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 28/12/1957 | 40580 | Transfer out to: | 14B | Kentish Town | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 28/12/1957 | 40675 | Transfer out to: | 5C | Stafford | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 28/12/1957 | 41164 | Transfer out to: | 17F | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 45344 | Transfer in from: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 45416 | Transfer in from: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 43981 | Transfer out to: | 6K | Rhyl | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/02/1958 | 45344 | Transfer out to: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/02/1958 | 45416 | Transfer out to: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 45403 | Transfer out to: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 09/08/1958 | 47631 | Transfer in from: | 16A | Nottingham | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 40635 | Transfer in from: | 10C | Patricroft | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 40699 | Transfer in from: | 10C | Patricroft | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 45180 | Transfer in from: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 45042 | Transfer out to: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 75034 | Transfer out to: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 75035 | Transfer out to: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 01/11/1958 | 40048 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 01/11/1958 | 40073 | Transfer in from: | 6E | Wrexham Rhosddu | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | w/e | 01/11/1958 | 41236 | Transfer in from: | 6E | Wrexham Rhosddu | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | w/e | 01/11/1958 | 41237 | Transfer in from: | 6E | Wrexham Rhosddu | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | w/e | 01/11/1958 | 41244 | Transfer in from: | 6E | Wrexham Rhosddu | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 08/11/1958 | 40058 | Transfer in from: | 84K | Wrexham Rhosddu | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | w/e | 15/11/1958 | 41226 | Transfer in from: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | w/e | 15/11/1958 | 41322 | Transfer in from: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | w/e | 15/11/1958 | 41323 | Transfer in from: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 13/12/1958 | 47372 | Transfer in from: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 10/01/1959 | 40008 | Transfer in from: | 84K | Wrexham Rhosddu | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 10/01/1959 | 40128 | Transfer in from: | 6E | Wrexham Rhosddu | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 17/01/1959 | 43615 | Transfer out to: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 28/03/1959 | 40128 | Transfer in from: | 6G | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 28/03/1959 | 40128 | Transfer out to: | 6G | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 11/04/1959 | 78059 | Transfer in from: | 6D | Chester Northgate | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | on | 06/06/1959 | 41120 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 75014 | Transfer in from: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 75031 | Transfer in from: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 78055 | Transfer in from: | 6D | Chester Northgate | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 78058 | Transfer in from: | 6D | Chester Northgate | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 44935 | Transfer out to: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | w/e | 25/07/1959 | 41237 | Transfer out to: | 6H | Bangor | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | w/e | 25/07/1959 | 41244 | Transfer out to: | 6H | Bangor | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | w/e | 25/07/1959 | 41323 | Transfer out to: | 6D | Chester Northgate | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 15/08/1959 | 48253 | Transfer in from: | 6F | Bidston | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 15/08/1959 | 48667 | Transfer in from: | 6F | Bidston | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 12/09/1959 | 75013 | Transfer out to: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 12/09/1959 | 75014 | Transfer out to: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 12/09/1959 | 75031 | Transfer out to: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 12/09/1959 | 75032 | Transfer out to: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | w/e | 10/10/1959 | 41226 | Transfer out to: | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | w/e | 10/10/1959 | 41322 | Transfer out to: | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 10/10/1959 | 47372 | Transfer out to: | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 17/10/1959 | 40073 | Transfer out to: | 16C | Mansfield | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 45534 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 46138 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 46150 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 46156 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 47558 | Transfer in from: | 6H | Bangor | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 48046 | Transfer in from: | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 78055 | Transfer out to: | 6K | Rhyl | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 78058 | Transfer out to: | 6H | Bangor | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 78059 | Transfer out to: | 6H | Bangor | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | on | 14/11/1959 | 40008 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | on | 14/11/1959 | 40048 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | on | 14/11/1959 | 40058 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | w/e | 19/12/1959 | 40699 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 19/12/1959 | 47394 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 45586 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 45704 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 45733 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 27/02/1960 | 46156 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 26/03/1960 | 46156 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 23/04/1960 | 44682 | Transfer in from: | 24K | Preston | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 23/04/1960 | 44827 | Transfer in from: | 24K | Preston | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 23/04/1960 | 45248 | Transfer in from: | 24K | Preston | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 14/05/1960 | 44686 | Transfer in from: | 21E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 21/05/1960 | 45180 | Transfer out to: | 21E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 11/06/1960 | 40077 | Transfer in from: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 11/06/1960 | 40093 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 11/06/1960 | 45586 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 11/06/1960 | 45704 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 11/06/1960 | 45733 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 45270 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 45370 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 46420 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 46447 | Transfer in from: | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 48697 | Transfer in from: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 45534 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 46138 | Transfer out to: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 46150 | Transfer out to: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 46156 | Transfer out to: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/07/1960 | 45038 | Transfer in from: | 3E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 16/07/1960 | 40185 | Transfer in from: | 16B | Kirkby in Ashfield | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | w/e | 06/08/1960 | 41227 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | w/e | 06/08/1960 | 41228 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/09/1960 | 45638 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/09/1960 | 45671 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 46138 | Transfer in from: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 46163 | Transfer in from: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 45270 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 45370 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 46420 | Transfer out to: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 46447 | Transfer out to: | 6H | Bangor | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 48697 | Transfer out to: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 01/10/1960 | 44742 | Transfer in from: | 21D | Aston | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 01/10/1960 | 44749 | Transfer in from: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 01/10/1960 | 45740 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 08/10/1960 | 44687 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 08/10/1960 | 44741 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 08/10/1960 | 44750 | Transfer in from: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 08/10/1960 | 44682 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 08/10/1960 | 44827 | Transfer out to: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 08/10/1960 | 44864 | Transfer out to: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 08/10/1960 | 44865 | Transfer out to: | 21D | Aston | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 08/10/1960 | 45038 | Transfer out to: | 21D | Aston | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 08/10/1960 | 45248 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | w/e | 12/11/1960 | 41228 | Transfer out to: | 24J | Lancaster Green Ayre | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 19/11/1960 | 45583 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 26/11/1960 | 45553 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 26/11/1960 | 45655 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 17/12/1960 | 40128 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 31/12/1960 | 40128 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 31/12/1960 | 45553 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/01/1961 | 45547 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | w/e | 21/01/1961 | 41322 | Transfer in from: | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | w/e | 11/02/1961 | 40635 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | w/e | 18/02/1961 | 41228 | Transfer in from: | 24J | Lancaster Green Ayre | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 11/04/1961 | 45056 | Transfer in from: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 11/04/1961 | 46138 | Transfer out to: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 11/04/1961 | 46163 | Transfer out to: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 40107 | Transfer in from: | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 40122 | Transfer in from: | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 40137 | Transfer in from: | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 45527 | Transfer in from: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 46114 | Transfer in from: | 21C | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 48655 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 75036 | Transfer in from: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 45547 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 45583 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 45638 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 45655 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 45671 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 45740 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | w/e | 24/06/1961 | 41238 | Transfer out to: | 72A | Exmouth Junction | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 01/07/1961 | 44936 | Transfer in from: | 24K | Preston | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 01/07/1961 | 45050 | Transfer in from: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 01/07/1961 | 45271 | Transfer in from: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 01/07/1961 | 45340 | Transfer in from: | 24K | Preston | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 08/07/1961 | 48246 | Transfer in from: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 08/07/1961 | 48771 | Transfer in from: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 08/07/1961 | 48046 | Transfer out to: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 08/07/1961 | 48667 | Transfer out to: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | on | 08/07/1961 | 40077 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 15/07/1961 | 40202 | Transfer in from: | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 29/07/1961 | 45271 | Transfer out to: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | on | 02/09/1961 | 40107 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 09/09/1961 | 45527 | Transfer out to: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 09/09/1961 | 46114 | Transfer out to: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 09/09/1961 | 48253 | Transfer out to: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 45583 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 45655 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 45671 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 45740 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 84020 | Transfer in from: | 72A | Exmouth Junction | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 84021 | Transfer in from: | 72A | Exmouth Junction | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 84022 | Transfer in from: | 72A | Exmouth Junction | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 40128 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 41322 | Transfer out to: | 72A | Exmouth Junction | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 23/09/1961 | 45525 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 23/09/1961 | 45530 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 23/09/1961 | 45534 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 23/09/1961 | 46101 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 23/09/1961 | 46120 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 23/09/1961 | 46144 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 23/09/1961 | 46152 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 23/09/1961 | 46154 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 23/09/1961 | 44741 | Transfer out to: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 23/09/1961 | 44742 | Transfer out to: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 23/09/1961 | 44936 | Transfer out to: | 2E | Northampton | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 23/09/1961 | 45050 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 23/09/1961 | 45056 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 23/09/1961 | 45583 | Transfer out to: | 21D | Aston | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 23/09/1961 | 45655 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 23/09/1961 | 45671 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 23/09/1961 | 45740 | Transfer out to: | 21D | Aston | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | w/e | 30/09/1961 | 41228 | Transfer out to: | 15C | Leicester Midland | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | w/e | 14/10/1961 | 41227 | Transfer out to: | 16D | Annesley | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 21/10/1961 | 45340 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | on | 21/10/1961 | 40095 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | on | 21/10/1961 | 40123 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | on | 21/10/1961 | 40130 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | on | 21/10/1961 | 40133 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 11/11/1961 | 44749 | Transfer out to: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 11/11/1961 | 44750 | Transfer out to: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 27/01/1962 | 40093 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 03/02/1962 | 40083 | Transfer in from: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 24/02/1962 | 40185 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 03/03/1962 | 46131 | Transfer in from: | 41D | Canklow | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/03/1962 | 45149 | Transfer in from: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/03/1962 | 46152 | Transfer out to: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/03/1962 | 46154 | Transfer out to: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 05/05/1962 | 45197 | Transfer in from: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 05/05/1962 | 45289 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 05/05/1962 | 45311 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 05/05/1962 | 45348 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 05/05/1962 | 45369 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 16/06/1962 | 40085 | Transfer in from: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 16/06/1962 | 40098 | Transfer in from: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 16/06/1962 | 40106 | Transfer in from: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 40086 | Transfer in from: | 24L | Carnforth | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 40138 | Transfer in from: | 24L | Carnforth | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 75032 | Transfer in from: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 46101 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 40122 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/07/1962 | 45530 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 07/07/1962 | 40085 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 14/07/1962 | 44760 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | w/e | 14/07/1962 | 84021 | Transfer out to: | Crewe Works | |||
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | w/e | 14/07/1962 | 84022 | Transfer out to: | Crewe Works | |||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | w/e | 28/07/1962 | 41278 | Transfer in from: | 2E | Northampton | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 46155 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 75034 | Transfer in from: | 6K | Rhyl | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 75035 | Transfer in from: | 6K | Rhyl | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 75050 | Transfer in from: | 6H | Bangor | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 48655 | Transfer out to: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 40202 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 22/09/1962 | 46148 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 22/09/1962 | 46165 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 22/09/1962 | 46170 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 22/09/1962 | 75033 | Transfer in from: | 6K | Rhyl | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 22/09/1962 | 40138 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 20/10/1962 | 75033 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | w/e | 03/11/1962 | 41236 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 03/11/1962 | 46131 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | w/e | 17/11/1962 | 41230 | Transfer in from: | 8D | Widnes | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 17/11/1962 | 73038 | Transfer in from: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 17/11/1962 | 40098 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 17/11/1962 | 40137 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | w/e | 17/11/1962 | 41235 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | w/e | 17/11/1962 | 41278 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 24/11/1962 | 40086 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 24/11/1962 | 40106 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | w/e | 01/12/1962 | 41244 | Transfer in from: | 8D | Widnes | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | w/e | 01/12/1962 | 84001 | Transfer in from: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 01/12/1962 | 40083 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 01/12/1962 | 46170 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 08/12/1962 | 70016 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | w/e | 08/12/1962 | 84009 | Transfer in from: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 15/12/1962 | 47631 | Transfer out to: | 26B | Agecroft | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | w/e | 22/12/1962 | 41230 | Transfer out to: | 75A | Brighton | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 22/12/1962 | 75034 | Transfer out to: | 21D | Aston | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 29/12/1962 | 70014 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 29/12/1962 | 70015 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 29/12/1962 | 70033 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 09/02/1963 | 47507 | Transfer in from: | 6K | Rhyl | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 09/02/1963 | 47669 | Transfer in from: | 6K | Rhyl | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 09/02/1963 | 73011 | Transfer in from: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 09/02/1963 | 73073 | Transfer in from: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | w/e | 09/02/1963 | 84003 | Transfer in from: | 6K | Rhyl | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 09/02/1963 | 45197 | Transfer out to: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 09/02/1963 | 45289 | Transfer out to: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 09/02/1963 | 45348 | Transfer out to: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 09/02/1963 | 45369 | Transfer out to: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 16/02/1963 | 42209 | Transfer in from: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 16/02/1963 | 42482 | Transfer in from: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/03/1963 | 45045 | Transfer in from: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/03/1963 | 45091 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/03/1963 | 45282 | Transfer in from: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/03/1963 | 45301 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/03/1963 | 45327 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 02/03/1963 | 70016 | Transfer out to: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 02/03/1963 | 70033 | Transfer out to: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 09/03/1963 | 75010 | Transfer out to: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 09/03/1963 | 75012 | Transfer out to: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 13/04/1963 | 44740 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 11/05/1963 | 44661 | Transfer in from: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 11/05/1963 | 45197 | Transfer in from: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 11/05/1963 | 45289 | Transfer in from: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 11/05/1963 | 45348 | Transfer in from: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 11/05/1963 | 45369 | Transfer in from: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | on | 11/05/1963 | 45525 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 18/05/1963 | 70017 | Transfer in from: | 21D | Aston | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 18/05/1963 | 70014 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 44774 | Transfer in from: | 14E | Bedford | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 44985 | Transfer in from: | 14E | Bedford | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 45277 | Transfer in from: | 14A | Cricklewood East | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 45197 | Transfer out to: | 14E | Bedford | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 45289 | Transfer out to: | 14E | Bedford | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 45301 | Transfer out to: | 14A | Cricklewood East | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 75011 | Transfer out to: | 17A | Derby | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 75032 | Transfer out to: | 27C | Southport | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 75050 | Transfer out to: | 27A | Bank Hall | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 41212 | Transfer in from: | 8G | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 45004 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 45020 | Transfer in from: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 45257 | Transfer in from: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 45387 | Transfer in from: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 42209 | Transfer out to: | 6H | Bangor | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 42482 | Transfer out to: | 6H | Bangor | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 45534 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 46120 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 46144 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 46155 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 46165 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 75036 | Transfer out to: | 6H | Bangor | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | w/e | 29/06/1963 | 41220 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | w/e | 29/06/1963 | 41212 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 29/06/1963 | 45020 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 29/06/1963 | 45257 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 29/06/1963 | 45387 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 29/06/1963 | 75035 | Transfer out to: | 6H | Bangor | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 44865 | Transfer in from: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 48648 | Transfer in from: | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 44686 | Transfer out to: | 8M | Southport | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 44687 | Transfer out to: | 8M | Southport | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 70015 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 70017 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 05/10/1963 | 45369 | Transfer out to: | 2E | Saltley | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/11/1963 | 45116 | Transfer in from: | 2F | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/11/1963 | 45279 | Transfer in from: | 2F | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/11/1963 | 45285 | Transfer in from: | 2F | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/11/1963 | 73011 | Transfer out to: | 1G | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/11/1963 | 73038 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/11/1963 | 73073 | Transfer out to: | 1G | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/12/1963 | 46148 | Transfer out to: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 18/01/1964 | 46148 | Transfer in from: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | w/e | 21/03/1964 | 84003 | Transfer out to: | 6C | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | w/e | 21/03/1964 | 84009 | Transfer out to: | 6C | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 21/03/1964 | 47558 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 11/04/1964 | 46148 | Transfer out to: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 18/04/1964 | 47598 | Transfer in from: | 5C | Stafford | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | w/e | 13/06/1964 | 84003 | Transfer in from: | 6C | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | w/e | 13/06/1964 | 84009 | Transfer in from: | 6C | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 41201 | Transfer in from: | 2M | Wellington | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 41202 | Transfer in from: | 6D | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 48246 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | w/e | 18/07/1964 | 41285 | Transfer in from: | 89D | Oswestry | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | w/e | 25/07/1964 | 41244 | Transfer out to: | 8K | Bank Hall | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 26/09/1964 | 45567 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 26/09/1964 | 45595 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 26/09/1964 | 45689 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/10/1964 | 45143 | Transfer in from: | 4A | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | w/e | 31/10/1964 | 84001 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | w/e | 31/10/1964 | 84020 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 07/11/1964 | 48648 | Transfer out to: | 8H | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 07/11/1964 | 48771 | Transfer out to: | 8H | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | w/e | 14/11/1964 | 41232 | Transfer in from: | 2L | Leamington | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | w/e | 14/11/1964 | 41272 | Transfer in from: | 84D | Leamington | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 12/12/1964 | 45689 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 19/12/1964 | 44525 | Transfer out to: | Crewe Works | |||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | w/e | 02/01/1965 | 41285 | Transfer out to: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 02/01/1965 | 44389 | Transfer out to: | 10G | Skipton | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 23/01/1965 | 45327 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 30/01/1965 | 45567 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 30/01/1965 | 45595 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 06/02/1965 | 44661 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 06/02/1965 | 44760 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 06/02/1965 | 44774 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 06/02/1965 | 44865 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 06/02/1965 | 44985 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 20/02/1965 | 47669 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 08/05/1965 | 45091 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 08/05/1965 | 45116 | Transfer out to: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 08/05/1965 | 45277 | Transfer out to: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 22/05/1965 | 47673 | Transfer in from: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 22/05/1965 | 47598 | Transfer out to: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | w/e | 12/06/1965 | 41204 | Transfer in from: | 6C | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | w/e | 12/06/1965 | 41241 | Transfer in from: | 6C | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 41200 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 41233 | Transfer in from: | 6H | Bangor | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 41234 | Transfer in from: | 6H | Bangor | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 75029 | Transfer in from: | 89B | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | w/e | 10/07/1965 | 41200 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | w/e | 10/07/1965 | 41201 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | w/e | 07/08/1965 | 41234 | Transfer out to: | 8G | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | w/e | 14/08/1965 | 41202 | Transfer out to: | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | w/e | 14/08/1965 | 41204 | Transfer out to: | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | w/e | 14/08/1965 | 41220 | Transfer out to: | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | w/e | 21/08/1965 | 41233 | Transfer out to: | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | w/e | 21/08/1965 | 41241 | Transfer out to: | 10G | Skipton | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | w/e | 21/08/1965 | 41272 | Transfer out to: | 10G | Skipton | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | w/e | 21/08/1965 | 41232 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 45045 | Transfer out to: | 6D | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 45143 | Transfer out to: | 6D | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 45311 | Transfer out to: | 6D | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 45348 | Transfer out to: | 6D | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | on | 02/10/1965 | 84003 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 13/11/1965 | 45345 | Transfer in from: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | w/e | 20/11/1965 | 84009 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 27/11/1965 | 45111 | Transfer in from: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 27/11/1965 | 45298 | Transfer in from: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 04/12/1965 | 45277 | Transfer in from: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 04/12/1965 | 45111 | Transfer out to: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 11/12/1965 | D2607 | Transfer in from: | 56G | Bradford Hammerton Street | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 19/02/1966 | 75009 | Transfer in from: | 89B | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 26/02/1966 | 70012 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 26/02/1966 | 70014 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 26/02/1966 | 70023 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 26/02/1966 | 70024 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 26/02/1966 | 70025 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 26/02/1966 | 70027 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 26/02/1966 | 70028 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 23/04/1966 | D2606 | Transfer in from: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 23/04/1966 | 45042 | Transfer in from: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 23/04/1966 | 48269 | Transfer in from: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 23/04/1966 | 48345 | Transfer in from: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 23/04/1966 | 48411 | Transfer in from: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 23/04/1966 | 48749 | Transfer in from: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 23/04/1966 | 70012 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 23/04/1966 | 70014 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 23/04/1966 | 70023 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 23/04/1966 | 70024 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 23/04/1966 | 70025 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 23/04/1966 | 70027 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 23/04/1966 | 70028 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 28/05/1966 | 44766 | Transfer in from: | 2C | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 28/05/1966 | 44875 | Transfer in from: | 2C | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 28/05/1966 | 45064 | Transfer in from: | 2C | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 28/05/1966 | 48269 | Transfer out to: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 28/05/1966 | 48345 | Transfer out to: | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 28/05/1966 | 48411 | Transfer out to: | 9J | Agecroft | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 28/05/1966 | 48749 | Transfer out to: | 9H | Patricroft | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 16/07/1966 | 75009 | Transfer out to: | 6F | Machynlleth | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 23/07/1966 | 44971 | Transfer in from: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 23/07/1966 | 47507 | Transfer out to: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | m/e | 09/1966 | 45004 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 03/09/1966 | 75029 | Transfer out to: | 6D | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 10/09/1966 | 47673 | Transfer out to: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 17/09/1966 | 44971 | Transfer out to: | 6D | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 17/09/1966 | 45149 | Transfer out to: | 6D | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 17/09/1966 | 45279 | Transfer out to: | 6D | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 08/10/1966 | 44766 | Transfer out to: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 08/10/1966 | 44875 | Transfer out to: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 08/10/1966 | 45042 | Transfer out to: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 08/10/1966 | 45064 | Transfer out to: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 08/10/1966 | 45277 | Transfer out to: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 08/10/1966 | 45282 | Transfer out to: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 08/10/1966 | 45298 | Transfer out to: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 08/10/1966 | 45345 | Transfer out to: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 15/10/1966 | D2603 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 14/01/1967 | D2604 | Transfer in from: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 14/01/1967 | D2605 | Transfer in from: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | on | 11/02/1967 | D2606 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 11/03/1967 | 45285 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | on | 12/08/1967 | D2603 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 30/12/1967 | 12039 | Transfer in from: | Crewe Works | |||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/12/1967 | D2604 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/12/1967 | D2605 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/12/1967 | D2607 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 27/01/1968 | D3084 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 27/01/1968 | 12039 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 15/08/1970 | 12082 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | on | 03/10/1971 | 12082 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D3049 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 05/02/1972 | D3084 | Transfer out to: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 23/08/1975 | 08036 | Transfer out to: | CH | Chester West |