Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 216 Today
» 1073 Yesterday
» 216 Week
» 11787 Month
» 260080 Year
» 1144461 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Lostock Hall


Type Class Wheels Period Date Number Event Code Depot Length of Stay Notes
Steam 18 2-4-2T 4w/e 22/06/1946 10891 Transfer in from:        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 22/06/1946 2434 Transfer in from:        
Steam 7F 0-8-0 w/e 13/12/1947 9585 Transfer in from:        
Steam 18 2-4-2T 01/01/1948 10891 Snapshot 25E Sowerby Bridge    
Steam 23 0-6-0ST 01/01/1948 11345 Snapshot        
Steam 23 0-6-0ST 01/01/1948 11423 Snapshot        
Steam 23 0-6-0ST 01/01/1948 11526 Snapshot        
Steam 27 0-6-0 01/01/1948 12160 Snapshot        
Steam 27 0-6-0 01/01/1948 12171 Snapshot        
Steam 27 0-6-0 01/01/1948 12244 Snapshot        
Steam 27 0-6-0 01/01/1948 12317 Snapshot        
Steam 27 0-6-0 01/01/1948 12334 Snapshot        
Steam 27 0-6-0 01/01/1948 12336 Snapshot        
Steam 27 0-6-0 01/01/1948 12368 Snapshot        
Steam 27 0-6-0 01/01/1948 12399 Snapshot        
Steam 27 0-6-0 01/01/1948 12460 Snapshot        
Steam 27 0-6-0 01/01/1948 12522 Snapshot        
Steam 28 0-6-0 01/01/1948 12541 Snapshot        
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 01/01/1948 190 Snapshot        
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 01/01/1948 191 Snapshot        
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 01/01/1948 192 Snapshot        
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 01/01/1948 194 Snapshot        
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 01/01/1948 198 Snapshot        
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 01/01/1948 199 Snapshot        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 01/01/1948 2434 Snapshot 24C Lostock Hall    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 01/01/1948 2434 Snapshot 24C Lostock Hall    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 01/01/1948 2435 Snapshot 24B Rose Grove    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 01/01/1948 2436 Snapshot        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 01/01/1948 2437 Snapshot        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 01/01/1948 2480 Snapshot        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 01/01/1948 2556 Snapshot        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 01/01/1948 2661 Snapshot        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 01/01/1948 42481 Snapshot        
Steam 7F 0-8-0 01/01/1948 49534 Snapshot        
Steam 7F 0-8-0 01/01/1948 49614 Snapshot        
Steam 7F 0-8-0 01/01/1948 49616 Snapshot        
Steam 27 0-6-0 01/01/1948 52467 Snapshot        
Steam 8F 2-8-0 01/01/1948 8526 Snapshot        
Steam 8F 2-8-0 01/01/1948 8527 Snapshot        
Steam 8F 2-8-0 01/01/1948 8528 Snapshot        
Steam 8F 2-8-0 01/01/1948 8529 Snapshot        
Steam 8F 2-8-0 01/01/1948 8719 Snapshot MEX Mexborough    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 01/01/1948 8720 Snapshot        
Steam 7F 0-8-0 01/01/1948 9502 Snapshot        
Steam 7F 0-8-0 01/01/1948 9503 Snapshot        
Steam 7F 0-8-0 01/01/1948 9523 Snapshot        
Steam 7F 0-8-0 01/01/1948 9524 Snapshot        
Steam 7F 0-8-0 01/01/1948 9585 Snapshot 24C Lostock Hall    
Steam 7F 0-8-0 01/01/1948 9585 Snapshot 24C Lostock Hall    
Steam 7F 0-8-0 01/01/1948 9611 Snapshot        
Steam 7F 0-8-0 01/01/1948 9612 Snapshot        
Steam 7F 0-8-0 01/01/1948 9615 Snapshot        
Steam 7F 0-8-0 01/01/1948 9617 Snapshot        
Steam 7F 0-8-0 01/01/1948 9640 Snapshot        
Steam 7F 0-8-0 01/01/1948 9649 Snapshot        
Steam 7F 0-8-0 w/e 07/02/1948 9502 Transfer out to: 26B Agecroft    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 15/05/1948 8718 Transfer in from: 24B Rose Grove    
Steam 27 0-6-0 w/e 22/05/1948 52467 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 05/06/1948 2491 Transfer in from:        
Steam 3P 2-6-2T w/e 05/06/1948 199 Transfer out to:        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 02/07/1948 42158 1st Allocation        
Steam 27 0-6-0 w/e 03/07/1948 12460 Transfer out to: 24D Lower Darwen    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 07/07/1948 42159 1st Allocation        
Steam 3P 2-6-2T w/e 24/07/1948 199 Transfer in from:        
Steam 27 0-6-0 w/e 31/07/1948 12272 Transfer in from: 23C Southport    
Steam 27 0-6-0 w/e 31/07/1948 12381 Transfer in from: 23C Southport    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T w/e 31/07/1948 190 Transfer out to: 23C Southport    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T w/e 31/07/1948 191 Transfer out to: 23C Southport    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T w/e 31/07/1948 192 Transfer out to: 23C Southport    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T w/e 31/07/1948 198 Transfer out to: 23C Southport    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T w/e 31/07/1948 199 Transfer out to: 23C Southport    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T w/e 31/07/1948 40194 Transfer out to: 23C Southport    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 11/09/1948 42159 Transfer out to:        
Steam 18 2-4-2T w/e 18/09/1948 50945 Transfer in from: 24D Lower Darwen    
Steam 18 2-4-2T w/e 18/09/1948 50953 Transfer in from: 24D Lower Darwen    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 26/11/1948 42178 1st Allocation        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 03/12/1948 42178 Transfer in from: 24C Lostock Hall    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 03/12/1948 42178 Transfer out to: 24C Lostock Hall    
Steam 27 0-6-0 3w/e 11/12/1948 12220 Transfer in from: 24B Rose Grove    
Steam 18 2-4-2T m/e 01/1949 50945 Condemned      
Steam 7F 0-8-0 m/e 03/1949 49616 Condemned      
Steam 7F 0-8-0 m/e 06/1949 49614 Condemned      
Steam 28 0-6-0 4w/e 16/07/1949 52541 Condemned      
Steam 7F 0-8-0 m/e 08/1949 49611 Condemned      
Steam 7F 0-8-0 w/e 10/12/1949 49585 Transfer out to: 23D Wigan Central (L&Y)    
Steam 27 0-6-0 w/e 17/12/1949 12524 Transfer in from: 24D Lower Darwen    
Steam 27 0-6-0 w/e 17/12/1949 52523 Transfer in from: 23C Southport    
Steam 27 0-6-0 5w/e 24/12/1949 12524 Transfer in from: 24C Lostock Hall    
Steam 27 0-6-0 5w/e 24/12/1949 12524 Transfer out to: 24C Lostock Hall    
Steam 27 0-6-0 5w/e 24/12/1949 52523 Transfer out to: 24D Lower Darwen    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 31/12/1949 48527 Transfer out to: 19D Heaton Mersey    
Steam 27 0-6-0 3w/e 14/01/1950 52523 Transfer in from: 24D Lower Darwen    
Steam 27 0-6-0 3w/e 14/01/1950 52334 Transfer out to: 26D Bury    
Steam 18 2-4-2T m/e 04/1950 50953 Condemned      
Steam 7F 0-8-0 25/04/1950 49615 Condemned      
Steam 1008 2-4-2T 4w/e 09/09/1950 50852 Transfer in from: 25A Wakefield    
Steam 7F 0-8-0 4w/e 09/09/1950 49617 Transfer out to: 27B Aintree    
Steam 1008 2-4-2T 4w/e 07/10/1950 50781 Transfer in from: 24D Lower Darwen    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 07/10/1950 48720 Transfer out to: 26A Newton Heath    
Steam 7F 0-8-0 02/11/1950 49534 Condemned      
Steam 7F 0-8-0 4w/e 04/11/1950 49612 Transfer out to: 27D Wigan Central (L&Y)    
Steam 7F 0-8-0 29/11/1950 49649 Condemned      
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 02/12/1950 48718 Transfer out to: 26A Newton Heath    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 31/12/1950 48719 Transfer out to: 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam 7F 0-8-0 4w/e 31/12/1950 49640 Transfer out to: 27B Aintree    
Steam 23 0-6-0ST 4w/e 31/12/1950 51423 Transfer out to: 28B Fleetwood    
Steam 7F 0-8-0 20/02/1951 49523 Condemned      
Steam 23 0-6-0ST 4w/e 24/02/1951 51423 Transfer in from: 28B Fleetwood    
Steam 28 0-6-0 4w/e 24/02/1951 52579 Transfer in from: 24D Lower Darwen    
Steam 1008 2-4-2T 4w/e 24/03/1951 50873 Transfer in from: 25D Mirfield    
Steam 27 0-6-0 4w/e 24/03/1951 52171 Transfer out to: 27B Aintree    
Steam 27 0-6-0 4w/e 17/07/1951 52368 Transfer out to: 28B Fleetwood    
Steam 28 0-6-0 4w/e 17/07/1951 52579 Transfer out to: 24B Rose Grove    
Steam 1008 2-4-2T 4w/e 11/08/1951 50720 Transfer in from: 24F Fleetwood    
Steam 27 0-6-0 4w/e 11/08/1951 52399 Transfer out to: 24D Lower Darwen    
Steam 1008 2-4-2T m/e 12/1951 50720 Condemned      
Steam 27 0-6-0 4w/e 26/01/1952 52458 Transfer in from: 24F Fleetwood    
Steam 28 0-6-0 4w/e 26/01/1952 52572 Transfer in from: 24E Blackpool Central    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 23/02/1952 90258 Transfer in from:        
Steam 27 0-6-0 4w/e 23/02/1952 52220 Transfer out to: 24D Lower Darwen    
Steam 27 0-6-0 4w/e 23/02/1952 52336 Transfer out to: 25D Mirfield    
Steam 28 0-6-0 4w/e 23/02/1952 52572 Transfer out to: 25D Mirfield    
Steam 1008 2-4-2T m/e 03/1952 50873 Condemned      
Steam 1008 2-4-2T 4w/e 22/03/1952 50831 Transfer in from: 24D Lower Darwen    
Steam 27 0-6-0 4w/e 22/03/1952 52431 Transfer in from: 24D Lower Darwen    
Steam 27 0-6-0 4w/e 22/03/1952 52522 Transfer out to: 24D Lower Darwen    
Steam 1008 2-4-2T 4w/e 19/04/1952 50764 Transfer in from: 24B Rose Grove    
Steam 27 0-6-0 8w/e 14/06/1952 52368 Transfer in from: 28B Fleetwood    
Steam 27 0-6-0 8w/e 14/06/1952 52244 Transfer out to: 25A Wakefield    
Steam 1008 2-4-2T 4w/e 12/07/1952 50831 Transfer out to: 25F Low Moor    
Steam 27 0-6-0 4w/e 09/08/1952 52182 Transfer in from: 28A Blackpool Central    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 09/08/1952 48529 Transfer out to: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 1008 2-4-2T m/e 01/1953 50852 Condemned      
Steam 27 0-6-0 5w/e 03/01/1953 52272 Transfer out to: 24D Lower Darwen    
Steam 27 0-6-0 3w/e 24/01/1953 52160 Transfer out to: 24D Lower Darwen    
Steam 1008 2-4-2T 4w/e 21/03/1953 50764 Transfer out to: 25F Low Moor    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 18/04/1953 48528 Transfer out to: 9F Heaton Mersey    
Steam 1008 2-4-2T 8w/e 11/07/1953 50712 Transfer in from: 28A Blackpool Central    
Steam 1008 2-4-2T 8w/e 11/07/1953 50725 Transfer in from: 24E Blackpool Central    
Steam 27 0-6-0 4w/e 08/08/1953 52203 Transfer in from: 25D Mirfield    
Steam 27 0-6-0 4w/e 08/08/1953 52431 Transfer out to: 24D Lower Darwen    
Steam 1008 2-4-2T 4w/e 31/10/1953 50781 Transfer out to: 27C Southport    
Steam 7F 0-8-0 12/12/1953 49524 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 27/02/1954 42178 Transfer out to: 1E Bletchley    
Steam 1008 2-4-2T 4w/e 24/04/1954 50777 Transfer in from: 27C Southport    
Steam 1008 2-4-2T 8w/e 19/06/1954 50725 Transfer out to: 25B Huddersfield    
Steam 1008 2-4-2T 8w/e 19/06/1954 50777 Transfer out to: 25E Sowerby Bridge    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 17/07/1954 42476 Transfer in from: 26D Bury    
Steam 27 0-6-0 4w/e 17/07/1954 52317 Transfer out to: 26A Newton Heath    
Steam 27 0-6-0 m/e 08/1954 52524 Condemned      
Steam 27 0-6-0 4w/e 14/08/1954 52445 Transfer in from: 24D Lower Darwen    
Steam 7F 0-8-0 21/08/1954 49503 Condemned      
Steam 27 0-6-0 4w/e 11/09/1954 52290 Transfer in from: 28B Fleetwood    
Steam 1008 2-4-2T 4w/e 09/10/1954 50712 Transfer out to: 27C Southport    
Steam 27 0-6-0 4w/e 04/12/1954 52272 Transfer in from: 24D Lower Darwen    
Steam 27 0-6-0 m/e 04/1955 52272 Condemned      
Steam 27 0-6-0 m/e 02/1956 52381 Condemned      
Steam 27 0-6-0 m/e 16/06/1956 52523 Transfer out to: 24E Blackpool Central    
Steam 23 0-6-0ST m/e 10/1956 51345 Condemned      
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 06/10/1956 90277 Transfer in from: 27D Wigan Central (L&Y)    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 01/12/1956 48526 Transfer out to: 1A Willesden    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 23/02/1957 90413 Transfer in from: 26B Agecroft    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 23/02/1957 90556 Transfer in from: 24F Fleetwood    
Steam 27 0-6-0 m/e 03/1957 52203 Condemned      
Steam 27 0-6-0 4w/e 23/03/1957 52216 Transfer in from: 24D Lower Darwen    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 20/04/1957 90266 Transfer in from: 24A Accrington    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 18/05/1957 42491 Transfer out to: 24H Hellifield    
Steam 27 0-6-0 m/e 08/1957 52368 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 10/08/1957 42634 Transfer in from: 24A Accrington    
Steam 23 0-6-0ST m/e 09/1957 51526 Condemned      
Steam 23 0-6-0ST 8w/e 05/10/1957 51457 Transfer in from: 26A Newton Heath    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 30/11/1957 42636 Transfer in from: 24E Blackpool Central    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 30/11/1957 42435 Transfer out to: 5D Stoke    
Steam 27 0-6-0 4w/e 25/01/1958 52429 Transfer in from: Crewe Works    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 22/02/1958 42480 Transfer out to: 24A Accrington    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 04/10/1958 D3374 Transfer in from: 26A Newton Heath    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 04/10/1958 42437 Transfer out to: 14D Neasden    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 04/10/1958 42556 Transfer out to: 14D Neasden    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 04/10/1958 42636 Transfer out to: 14D Neasden    
Steam 23 0-6-0ST 4w/e 04/10/1958 51457 Transfer out to: 26A Newton Heath    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 w/e 29/11/1958 90584 Transfer in from: 24H Hellifield    
Steam 23 0-6-0ST m/e 12/1958 51423 Condemned      
Steam 27 0-6-0 m/e 12/1958 52216 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 10/01/1959 42286 Transfer in from: 26D Bury    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T w/e 07/02/1959 40192 Transfer in from: 24A Accrington    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 w/e 07/02/1959 90675 Transfer in from: 26A Newton Heath    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 20/06/1959 42187 Transfer in from: 25F Low Moor    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 20/06/1959 42480 Transfer in from: 24A Accrington    
Steam 27 0-6-0 m/e 08/1959 52458 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 08/08/1959 42321 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 08/08/1959 42350 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 12/09/1959 42350 Transfer out to: 1A Willesden    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 19/09/1959 42321 Transfer out to: 1A Willesden    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T w/e 10/10/1959 40183 Transfer in from: 24D Lower Darwen    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 09/01/1960 42433 Transfer in from: 24A Accrington    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 09/01/1960 42661 Transfer in from: 24C Lostock Hall    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 09/01/1960 42661 Transfer out to: 24C Lostock Hall    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 09/04/1960 42296 Transfer in from: 87E Landore    
Steam 27 0-6-0 w/e 09/04/1960 52182 Transfer out to: 26C Bolton    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 w/e 18/06/1960 90564 Transfer in from: 26B Agecroft    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 w/e 18/06/1960 90713 Transfer in from: 26C Bolton    
Steam 27 0-6-0 w/e 25/06/1960 52290 Transfer out to: 24B Rose Grove    
Steam 27 0-6-0 m/e 10/1960 52429 Condemned      
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 22/10/1960 47386 Transfer in from: 24B Rose Grove    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T w/e 05/11/1960 40183 Transfer out to: 24D Lower Darwen    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T w/e 05/11/1960 40192 Transfer out to: 24D Lower Darwen    
Steam 27 0-6-0 w/e 26/11/1960 52445 Condemned      
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 10/12/1960 47572 Transfer in from: 25A Wakefield    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 16/09/1961 D3172 Transfer in from: 24K Preston    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 16/09/1961 D3368 Transfer in from: 24K Preston    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 16/09/1961 D3369 Transfer in from: 24K Preston    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 16/09/1961 D3371 Transfer in from: 24K Preston    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 16/09/1961 D3581 Transfer in from: 24K Preston    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 16/09/1961 D3846 Transfer in from: 24K Preston    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 16/09/1961 46449 Transfer in from: 24K Preston    
Steam 0F 0-4-0ST w/e 16/09/1961 47008 Transfer in from: 10B Preston    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 16/09/1961 47293 Transfer in from: 10E Sutton Oak    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 16/09/1961 47319 Transfer in from: 12E Moor Row    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 16/09/1961 47360 Transfer in from: 10B Preston    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 16/09/1961 47413 Transfer in from: 10B Preston    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 16/09/1961 47472 Transfer in from: 10B Preston    
Steam G1 0-8-0 w/e 16/09/1961 49135 Transfer in from: 24K Preston    
Steam G2A 0-8-0 w/e 16/09/1961 49382 Transfer in from: 25G Farnley Junction    
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 w/e 16/09/1961 78036 Transfer in from: 10B Preston    
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 w/e 16/09/1961 78037 Transfer in from: 10B Preston    
Steam G1 0-8-0 w/e 23/09/1961 49135 Transfer out to: 26F Patricroft    
Steam G2A 0-8-0 w/e 23/09/1961 49382 Transfer out to: 26F Patricroft    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 w/e 23/09/1961 90413 Transfer out to: 26D Bury    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 w/e 23/09/1961 90556 Transfer out to: 24D Lower Darwen    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 w/e 07/10/1961 90564 Transfer out to: 26B Agecroft    
Steam 0F 0-4-0ST w/e 16/12/1961 47002 Transfer in from:        
Diesel 08 0-6-0 18/01/1962 D4115 1st Allocation        
Diesel 09 0-6-0 21/01/1962 D4114 1st Allocation        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 10/02/1962 42187 Transfer out to: 24F Fleetwood    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 10/02/1962 42434 Transfer out to: 24F Fleetwood    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 10/02/1962 42634 Transfer out to: 24B Rose Grove    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 12/05/1962 42433 Condemned      
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 14/05/1962 47572 Condemned      
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 w/e 11/08/1962 90266 Transfer out to: 24B Rose Grove    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 w/e 11/08/1962 90584 Transfer out to: 24B Rose Grove    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T m/e 09/1962 47319 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 15/09/1962 42147 Transfer in from:        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 15/09/1962 42154 Transfer in from: 24D Lower Darwen    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 15/09/1962 46452 Transfer in from: 20F Skipton    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 15/09/1962 46501 Transfer in from: 24G Skipton    
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 w/e 15/09/1962 78036 Transfer out to: 24G Skipton    
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 w/e 15/09/1962 78037 Transfer out to: 24G Skipton    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 29/09/1962 42476 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 29/09/1962 42661 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 19/01/1963 42480 Condemned      
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 06/04/1963 47201 Transfer in from: 24B Rose Grove    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 27/04/1963 47386 Condemned      
Steam 3F 0-6-0T m/e 05/1963 47413 Condemned      
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 11/05/1963 47336 Transfer in from: 8A Edge Hill    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 11/05/1963 47564 Transfer in from: 12E Barrow in Furness    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 18/05/1963 D3563 Transfer in from: 67C Ayr    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 22/06/1963 42187 Transfer in from: 12C Carlisle Canal    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 22/06/1963 42439 Transfer in from: 26F Patricroft    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 22/06/1963 42445 Transfer in from: 8C Speke Junction    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 22/06/1963 42484 Transfer in from: 24H Hellifield    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 22/06/1963 42492 Transfer in from: 24H Hellifield    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 22/06/1963 42584 Transfer in from: 8C Speke Junction    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 22/06/1963 44889 Transfer in from: 24F Fleetwood    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 22/06/1963 44894 Transfer in from: 24F Fleetwood    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 22/06/1963 45226 Transfer in from: 24F Fleetwood    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 29/06/1963 42425 Transfer in from: 9A Longsight    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 29/06/1963 47211 Transfer in from: 12A Carlisle Kingmoor    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T m/e 07/1963 47360 Condemned      
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 10/08/1963 47577 Transfer in from: 24G Skipton    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 17/08/1963 42546 Transfer in from: 24B Rose Grove    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 07/09/1963 42425 Condemned      
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 w/e 14/09/1963 90125 Transfer in from: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 w/e 14/09/1963 90535 Transfer in from: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 14/09/1963 42492 Transfer out to: 10G Skipton    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 14/09/1963 46449 Transfer out to: 9P Lees (Oldham)    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 28/09/1963 42492 Transfer in from: 10G Skipton    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 m/e 10/1963 90713 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 19/10/1963 42492 Transfer out to: 9D Newton Heath    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 23/11/1963 44889 Transfer out to: 10J Lancaster Green Ayre    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 30/11/1963 44894 Transfer out to: 10J Lancaster Green Ayre    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 w/e 21/12/1963 90125 Transfer out to: 16E Kirkby in Ashfield    
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 w/e 28/12/1963 78022 Transfer in from: 27B Aintree    
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 w/e 28/12/1963 78044 Transfer in from: 27B Aintree    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 11/01/1964 46452 Transfer out to: 9P Lees (Oldham)    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 11/01/1964 46501 Transfer out to: 9M Bury    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 w/e 18/01/1964 90264 Transfer in from:        
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 w/e 18/01/1964 90297 Transfer in from: 24B Rose Grove    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 08/02/1964 42147 Transfer out to: 10A Carnforth    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 22/02/1964 44673 Transfer in from:        
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 22/02/1964 44674 Transfer in from:        
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 22/02/1964 44675 Transfer in from:        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 14/03/1964 42484 Transfer out to: 9K Bolton    
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 w/e 11/04/1964 78040 Transfer in from: 27B Aintree    
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 w/e 11/04/1964 78044 Transfer out to: 8L Aintree    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 w/e 18/04/1964 90125 Transfer in from: 16E Kirkby in Ashfield    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 25/04/1964 42439 Transfer out to: 10B Blackpool Central    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 30/05/1964 42154 Transfer out to: 10A Carnforth    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 20/06/1964 45034 Transfer in from: 8C Speke Junction    
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 w/e 20/06/1964 78002 Transfer in from: 8K Bank Hall    
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 w/e 20/06/1964 78041 Transfer in from: 27A Bank Hall    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 27/06/1964 44816 Transfer in from: 8K Bank Hall    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 11/07/1964 44692 Transfer in from: 12A Carlisle Kingmoor    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 11/07/1964 45197 Transfer in from: 8C Speke Junction    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 11/07/1964 45034 Transfer out to: 8C Speke Junction    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 18/07/1964 42584 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T m/e 08/1964 80129 Reinstated        
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 m/e 08/1964 90264 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T m/e 09/1964 80125 Reinstated        
Steam 0F 0-4-0ST m/e 09/1964 47002 Condemned      
Steam 0F 0-4-0ST m/e 09/1964 47008 Condemned      
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 m/e 09/1964 90297 Condemned      
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 12/09/1964 48307 Transfer in from: 82F Bath Green Park (S&D)    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 12/09/1964 48328 Transfer in from: 87F Llanelly    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 12/09/1964 48400 Transfer in from: 87F Llanelly    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 12/09/1964 48419 Transfer in from: 87F Llanelly    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 12/09/1964 48434 Transfer in from: 87F Llanelly    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 12/09/1964 48438 Transfer in from: 82F Bath Green Park (S&D)    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 12/09/1964 48470 Transfer in from: 82F Bath Green Park (S&D)    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 12/09/1964 48707 Transfer in from: 82F Bath Green Park (S&D)    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 12/09/1964 48730 Transfer in from: 82F Bath Green Park (S&D)    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 12/09/1964 48735 Transfer in from: 87F Llanelly    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 w/e 12/09/1964 90258 Transfer out to: 41J Langwith Junction    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 w/e 12/09/1964 90277 Transfer out to: 36A Doncaster    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 w/e 12/09/1964 90675 Transfer out to: 36A Doncaster    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 19/09/1964 42625 Transfer in from: 24E Blackpool Central    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 26/09/1964 42081 Transfer in from: 10C Fleetwood    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 26/09/1964 47333 Transfer in from: 24B Rose Grove    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 26/09/1964 47454 Transfer in from: 20F Skipton    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 26/09/1964 47201 Transfer out to: 10G Skipton    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 26/09/1964 47211 Transfer out to: 10F Rose Grove    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 26/09/1964 42481 Condemned      
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 m/e 10/1964 90535 Condemned      
Diesel 02 0-4-0 w/e 10/10/1964 D2862 Transfer in from: 24F Fleetwood    
Diesel 02 0-4-0 w/e 10/10/1964 D2868 Transfer in from: 10C Fleetwood    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 10/10/1964 44674 Transfer out to: 12A Carlisle Kingmoor    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 10/10/1964 44692 Transfer out to: 12A Carlisle Kingmoor    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 10/10/1964 80125 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 10/10/1964 80129 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 17/10/1964 42445 Condemned      
Steam 3F 0-6-0T m/e 11/1964 47333 Condemned      
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 26/12/1964 47577 Transfer out to: 12B Carlisle Upperby    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 26/12/1964 42286 Condemned      
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 02/01/1965 48039 Transfer in from: 9L Buxton (LNWR)    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 09/01/1965 42660 Transfer in from: 9D Newton Heath    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 09/01/1965 48062 Transfer in from: 9D Buxton (LNWR)    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 06/02/1965 44673 Transfer out to: 9E Trafford Park (LMS)    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 06/02/1965 48062 Transfer out to: 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T m/e 03/1965 47564 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 w/e 06/03/1965 78037 Transfer in from: 16C Derby    
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 w/e 06/03/1965 78057 Transfer in from: 16C Derby    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 13/03/1965 44675 Transfer out to: 10C Fleetwood    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 20/03/1965 48735 Transfer out to: 8E Northwich    
Diesel 02 0-4-0 w/e 27/03/1965 D2867 Transfer in from: 10C Fleetwood    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 27/03/1965 D3782 Transfer in from: 24B Rose Grove    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 27/03/1965 D3783 Transfer in from: 24B Rose Grove    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 27/03/1965 42442 Transfer in from: 10C Patricroft    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 03/04/1965 42297 Transfer in from: 9H Patricroft    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 17/04/1965 42660 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 24/04/1965 42158 Condemned      
Steam 8F 2-8-0 m/e 05/1965 48419 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 01/05/1965 42468 Transfer in from: 10C Patricroft    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 22/05/1965 48716 Transfer in from: 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 22/05/1965 48771 Transfer in from: 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 19/06/1965 48211 Transfer in from: 10C Fleetwood    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 19/06/1965 48618 Transfer in from: 10C Fleetwood    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 26/06/1965 42096 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 26/06/1965 45351 Transfer in from: 9K Bolton    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 26/06/1965 45402 Transfer in from: 8A Edge Hill    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T m/e 07/1965 42296 Condemned      
Steam 3F 0-6-0T m/e 07/1965 47454 Condemned      
Steam 8F 2-8-0 m/e 07/1965 48039 Condemned      
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 m/e 07/1965 90125 Condemned      
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 03/07/1965 44918 Transfer in from: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 03/07/1965 44958 Transfer in from: 27B Aintree    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 03/07/1965 45346 Transfer in from: 16B Annesley    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 03/07/1965 45450 Transfer in from: 16D Annesley    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 10/07/1965 44915 Transfer in from: 1E Bletchley    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 24/07/1965 42287 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 24/07/1965 48002 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 24/07/1965 48079 Transfer in from: 16A Toton    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 24/07/1965 48141 Transfer in from: 16A Toton    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 m/e 08/1965 45351 Condemned      
Steam 8F 2-8-0 m/e 08/1965 48716 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 07/08/1965 42442 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 14/08/1965 42295 Transfer in from: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 14/08/1965 45258 Transfer in from: 10J Lancaster Green Ayre    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 21/08/1965 42251 Transfer in from: 6A Chester (Midland)    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 m/e 09/1965 48328 Condemned      
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 18/09/1965 44816 Transfer out to: 9K Bolton    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 18/09/1965 44918 Transfer out to: 9E Trafford Park (LMS)    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 18/09/1965 45258 Transfer out to: 9K Bolton    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 18/09/1965 45346 Transfer out to: 9E Trafford Park (LMS)    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 25/09/1965 42468 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 16/10/1965 42295 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 30/10/1965 42105 Transfer in from: 10A Carnforth    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 06/11/1965 42287 Transfer out to: 9E Trafford Park (LMS)    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 13/11/1965 48302 Transfer in from: 10J Lancaster Green Ayre    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 13/11/1965 48679 Transfer in from: 10J Lancaster Green Ayre    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 13/11/1965 42081 Transfer out to: 9E Trafford Park (LMS)    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 13/11/1965 48079 Transfer out to: 10J Lancaster Green Ayre    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 13/11/1965 48211 Transfer out to: 10J Lancaster Green Ayre    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 m/e 12/1965 48434 Condemned      
Steam 8F 2-8-0 m/e 12/1965 48771 Condemned      
Steam 8F 2-8-0 m/e 01/1966 48302 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 m/e 01/1966 78040 Condemned      
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 15/01/1966 48739 Transfer in from: 10A Carnforth    
Diesel 02 0-4-0 w/e 19/02/1966 D2860 Transfer in from: 24F Fleetwood    
Diesel 02 0-4-0 w/e 19/02/1966 D2861 Transfer in from: 24F Fleetwood    
Diesel 02 0-4-0 w/e 19/02/1966 D2863 Transfer in from: 24F Fleetwood    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 19/02/1966 42224 Transfer in from: 10C Fleetwood    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 19/02/1966 42431 Transfer in from: 10C Fleetwood    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 19/02/1966 43019 Transfer in from: 10H Lower Darwen    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 19/02/1966 43041 Transfer in from: 10H Lower Darwen    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 19/02/1966 43046 Transfer in from: 10H Lower Darwen    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 19/02/1966 43118 Transfer in from: 10H Lower Darwen    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 19/02/1966 43119 Transfer in from: 10H Lower Darwen    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 19/02/1966 45107 Transfer in from: 28B Fleetwood    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 19/02/1966 45347 Transfer in from: 10C Fleetwood    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 19/02/1966 45444 Transfer in from: 10C Fleetwood    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 19/02/1966 47201 Transfer in from: 10C Fleetwood    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 19/02/1966 47599 Transfer in from: 10C Fleetwood    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 19/02/1966 48141 Transfer out to: 10F Rose Grove    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 19/02/1966 48400 Transfer out to: 10F Rose Grove    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 19/03/1966 45421 Transfer in from: 10C Fleetwood    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 09/04/1966 47201 Transfer out to: 9J Agecroft    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 09/04/1966 47599 Transfer out to: 10G Skipton    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 23/04/1966 48077 Transfer in from: 10J Lancaster Green Ayre    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 23/04/1966 48079 Transfer in from: 10J Lancaster Green Ayre    
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 m/e 05/1966 78057 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 07/05/1966 42431 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 07/05/1966 42625 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 28/05/1966 42436 Condemned      
Steam 3F 0-6-0T m/e 06/1966 47336 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 m/e 06/1966 78002 Condemned      
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 04/06/1966 48320 Transfer in from: 2B Nuneaton    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 04/06/1966 48445 Transfer in from: 5E Nuneaton    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 18/06/1966 42251 Transfer out to: 12E Tebay    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 25/06/1966 48637 Transfer in from: 15A Leicester Midland    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 16/07/1966 48062 Transfer in from: 10F Rose Grove    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 16/07/1966 48079 Transfer out to: 10F Rose Grove    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 23/07/1966 47314 Transfer in from: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 23/07/1966 48468 Transfer in from: 2C Stourbridge Junction    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 m/e 09/1966 48002 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 m/e 09/1966 78022 Condemned      
Steam 8F 2-8-0 m/e 10/1966 48679 Condemned      
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 22/10/1966 48164 Transfer in from: 9J Agecroft    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 22/10/1966 48266 Transfer in from: 9J Agecroft    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 22/10/1966 48666 Transfer in from: 9J Agecroft    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 05/11/1966 D3005 Transfer in from: 67C Ayr    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 05/11/1966 D3006 Transfer in from: 67C Ayr    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 05/11/1966 D3007 Transfer in from: 67B Hurlford    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 05/11/1966 D3210 Transfer in from: 65A Eastfield    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 05/11/1966 D3410 Transfer in from: 65A Eastfield    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 05/11/1966 D3530 Transfer in from: 65E Kipps    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 05/11/1966 D3531 Transfer in from: 65E Kipps    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 05/11/1966 D3897 Transfer in from: 65A Eastfield    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 12/11/1966 48393 Transfer in from: 40E Colwick    
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 w/e 12/11/1966 78020 Transfer in from: 16A Toton    
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 w/e 12/11/1966 78021 Transfer in from: 16A Toton    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 26/11/1966 43119 Transfer out to: 12E Tebay    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 26/11/1966 47314 Condemned      
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 26/11/1966 47472 Condemned      
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 03/12/1966 47293 Transfer out to: 10G Skipton    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 10/12/1966 47326 Transfer in from: 12A Carlisle Kingmoor    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 10/12/1966 47531 Transfer in from: 12D Workington    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 10/12/1966 48510 Transfer in from: 40E Colwick    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 17/12/1966 42105 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 24/12/1966 42096 Condemned      
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 24/12/1966 47326 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 07/01/1967 42611 Transfer in from: 12E Tebay    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 14/01/1967 45197 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 21/01/1967 42224 Condemned      
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 21/01/1967 48739 Condemned      
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 28/01/1967 45141 Transfer in from: 12A Carlisle Kingmoor    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 04/02/1967 45339 Transfer in from: 10F Rose Grove    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 04/02/1967 48517 Transfer in from: 2E Saltley    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 04/02/1967 48646 Transfer in from: 2E Saltley    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 04/02/1967 47531 Condemned      
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 18/02/1967 48492 Transfer in from: 16E Kirkby in Ashfield    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 04/03/1967 44958 Condemned      
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 11/03/1967 44942 Transfer in from: 6D Shrewsbury    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 11/03/1967 45149 Transfer in from: 6D Shrewsbury    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 11/03/1967 43118 Transfer out to: 12D Workington    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 11/03/1967 45141 Condemned      
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 18/03/1967 48556 Transfer in from: 2E Saltley    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 18/03/1967 48320 Condemned      
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 01/04/1967 44971 Transfer in from: 6D Shrewsbury    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 01/04/1967 45227 Transfer in from: 10A Carnforth    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 01/04/1967 45373 Transfer in from: 10A Carnforth    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 01/04/1967 42546 Condemned      
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 15/04/1967 48707 Condemned      
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 22/04/1967 43029 Transfer in from: 12H Tebay    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 22/04/1967 43033 Transfer in from: 12E Tebay    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 22/04/1967 45402 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 06/05/1967 42297 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 w/e 06/05/1967 78020 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 w/e 06/05/1967 78021 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 w/e 06/05/1967 78037 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 w/e 06/05/1967 78041 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 13/05/1967 75009 Transfer in from: 6C Croes Newydd    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 13/05/1967 75010 Transfer in from: 6C Croes Newydd    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 13/05/1967 75062 Transfer in from: 5D Stoke    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 13/05/1967 42187 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 13/05/1967 42611 Condemned      
Diesel 11 0-6-0 w/e 20/05/1967 12034 Transfer in from: 8C Speke Junction    
Diesel 11 0-6-0 w/e 20/05/1967 12038 Transfer in from: 8C Speke Junction    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 20/05/1967 D3367 Transfer in from: 8C Speke Junction    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 20/05/1967 44872 Transfer in from: 6C Croes Newydd    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 20/05/1967 45345 Transfer in from: 6A Chester (Midland)    
Diesel 11 0-6-0 w/e 20/05/1967 7121 Transfer in from: 8C Speke Junction    
Diesel 11 0-6-0 w/e 20/05/1967 7125 Transfer in from: 8C Speke Junction    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 27/05/1967 45000 Transfer in from: 6A Chester (Midland)    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 27/05/1967 75048 Transfer in from: 6C Croes Newydd    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 17/06/1967 48393 Transfer out to: 10F Rose Grove    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 17/06/1967 48666 Transfer out to: 10F Rose Grove    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 17/06/1967 48730 Transfer out to: 10F Rose Grove    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 17/06/1967 48266 Condemned      
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 24/06/1967 43004 Transfer in from: 10A Carnforth    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 24/06/1967 43119 Transfer in from: 10A Carnforth    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 24/06/1967 44713 Transfer in from: 5D Stoke    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 24/06/1967 48468 Transfer out to: 10F Rose Grove    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 24/06/1967 48556 Transfer out to: 10F Rose Grove    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 24/06/1967 75009 Transfer out to: 10A Carnforth    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 24/06/1967 75010 Transfer out to: 10A Carnforth    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 24/06/1967 75048 Transfer out to: 10A Carnforth    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 24/06/1967 75062 Transfer out to: 10A Carnforth    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 01/07/1967 45339 Condemned      
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 12/08/1967 45391 Transfer in from: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 12/08/1967 43041 Condemned      
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 12/08/1967 43119 Condemned      
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 19/08/1967 43088 Transfer in from: 5B Crewe South    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 19/08/1967 44800 Transfer in from: 5B Crewe South    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 19/08/1967 45353 Transfer in from: 5B Crewe South    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 19/08/1967 45436 Transfer in from: 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 w/e 26/08/1967 D210 Transfer in from: WL Western Lines (LMR)    
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo w/e 26/08/1967 D5238 Transfer in from: D05 Stoke Division    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 m/e 09/1967 43004 Condemned      
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 09/09/1967 D3580 Transfer in from: 12A Carlisle Kingmoor    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 16/09/1967 45107 Condemned      
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 16/09/1967 45226 Condemned      
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 16/09/1967 48637 Condemned      
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 23/09/1967 43106 Transfer in from: 12A Carlisle Kingmoor    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 23/09/1967 45373 Condemned      
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 23/09/1967 48618 Condemned      
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 30/09/1967 43029 Condemned      
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 30/09/1967 44872 Condemned      
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 m/e 10/1967 45000 Condemned      
Steam 8F 2-8-0 m/e 10/1967 48164 Condemned      
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 07/10/1967 44816 Transfer in from: 8B Warrington Dallam    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 07/10/1967 45041 Transfer in from: 8B Warrington Dallam    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 14/10/1967 48062 Transfer out to: 10F Rose Grove    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 m/e 11/1967 45347 Condemned      
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 11/11/1967 48307 Transfer out to: 9H Patricroft    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 11/11/1967 48470 Transfer out to: 9H Patricroft    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 18/11/1967 45450 Condemned      
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 18/11/1967 48438 Condemned      
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 25/11/1967 43046 Condemned      
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 02/12/1967 48517 Condemned      
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 09/12/1967 44683 Transfer in from: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 09/12/1967 44761 Transfer in from: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 09/12/1967 44915 Condemned      
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 09/12/1967 45041 Condemned      
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 m/e 01/1968 45227 Condemned      
Steam 8F 2-8-0 m/e 01/1968 48510 Condemned      
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 06/01/1968 43006 Transfer in from: 12F Workington    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 06/01/1968 43008 Transfer in from: 12D Workington    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 06/01/1968 43027 Transfer in from: 12D Workington    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 06/01/1968 44672 Transfer in from:        
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 06/01/1968 44878 Transfer in from: 12A Carlisle Kingmoor    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 06/01/1968 45212 Transfer in from: 12A Carlisle Kingmoor    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 06/01/1968 48253 Transfer in from: 8C Speke Junction    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 06/01/1968 48335 Transfer in from: 9D Newton Heath    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 06/01/1968 48476 Transfer in from: 8C Speke Junction    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 m/e 02/1968 45391 Condemned      
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 m/e 02/1968 45421 Condemned      
Steam 8F 2-8-0 m/e 02/1968 48492 Condemned      
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 m/e 03/1968 44672 Condemned      
Steam 8F 2-8-0 m/e 03/1968 48077 Condemned      
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 02/03/1968 43006 Condemned      
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 02/03/1968 43008 Condemned      
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 02/03/1968 43033 Condemned      
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 09/03/1968 48392 Transfer in from: 9E Trafford Park (LMS)    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 09/03/1968 48763 Transfer in from: 9E Trafford Park (LMS)    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 16/03/1968 44800 Condemned      
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 30/03/1968 48392 Transfer out to: 9K Bolton    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 30/03/1968 48335 Condemned      
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 13/04/1968 44683 Condemned      
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 13/04/1968 44761 Condemned      
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 13/04/1968 45436 Condemned      
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 13/04/1968 48763 Condemned      
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 20/04/1968 44806 Transfer in from: 8C Speke Junction    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 20/04/1968 44950 Transfer in from: 8C Speke Junction    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 04/05/1968 43019 Condemned      
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 04/05/1968 43027 Condemned      
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 04/05/1968 48445 Condemned      
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 11/05/1968 45305 Transfer in from: 8C Speke Junction    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 11/05/1968 45386 Transfer in from: 8C Speke Junction    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 11/05/1968 45388 Transfer in from: 8C Speke Junction    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 11/05/1968 45407 Transfer in from: 8C Speke Junction    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 11/05/1968 48293 Transfer in from: 8A Edge Hill    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 11/05/1968 48294 Transfer in from: 8A Edge Hill    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 11/05/1968 48546 Transfer in from: 9F Heaton Mersey    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 11/05/1968 48723 Transfer in from: 9F Heaton Mersey    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 11/05/1968 48765 Transfer in from: 9F Heaton Mersey    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 m/e 06/1968 44942 Condemned      
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 m/e 06/1968 45149 Condemned      
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 m/e 06/1968 45345 Condemned      
Steam 8F 2-8-0 m/e 06/1968 48293 Condemned      
Steam 8F 2-8-0 m/e 06/1968 48646 Condemned      
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 22/06/1968 43106 Condemned      
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 m/e 07/1968 44816 Condemned      
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 m/e 07/1968 44878 Condemned      
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 m/e 07/1968 45353 Condemned      
Steam 8F 2-8-0 m/e 07/1968 48546 Condemned      
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 06/07/1968 44888 Transfer in from: 9K Bolton    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 06/07/1968 45055 Transfer in from: 9H Patricroft    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 06/07/1968 45073 Transfer in from: 9K Bolton    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 06/07/1968 45110 Transfer in from: 9K Bolton    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 06/07/1968 45260 Transfer in from: 9K Bolton    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 06/07/1968 45269 Transfer in from: 9K Bolton    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 06/07/1968 45318 Transfer in from: 9K Bolton    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 06/07/1968 48775 Transfer in from: 9H Patricroft    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 27/07/1968 D3007 Transfer in from: 10A Carnforth    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 m/e 08/1968 44713 Condemned      
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 m/e 08/1968 44806 Condemned      
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 m/e 08/1968 44888 Condemned      
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 m/e 08/1968 44950 Condemned      
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 m/e 08/1968 44971 Condemned      
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 m/e 08/1968 45055 Condemned      
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 m/e 08/1968 45073 Condemned      
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 m/e 08/1968 45110 Condemned      
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 m/e 08/1968 45212 Condemned      
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 m/e 08/1968 45260 Condemned      
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 m/e 08/1968 45269 Condemned      
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 m/e 08/1968 45305 Condemned      
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 m/e 08/1968 45318 Condemned      
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 m/e 08/1968 45386 Condemned      
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 m/e 08/1968 45388 Condemned      
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 m/e 08/1968 45407 Condemned      
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 m/e 08/1968 45444 Condemned      
Steam 8F 2-8-0 m/e 08/1968 48253 Condemned      
Steam 8F 2-8-0 m/e 08/1968 48294 Condemned      
Steam 8F 2-8-0 m/e 08/1968 48476 Condemned      
Steam 8F 2-8-0 m/e 08/1968 48723 Condemned      
Steam 8F 2-8-0 m/e 08/1968 48765 Condemned      
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 12/10/1968 D3008 Transfer in from: 12C Barrow in Furness    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 16/11/1968 D3412 Transfer in from: 12C Barrow in Furness    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 04/01/1969 D3006 Transfer in from: 5A Crewe Diesel    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 04/01/1969 D3007 Transfer in from: 9A Longsight    
Diesel 02 0-4-0 w/e 13/09/1969 D2868 Transfer in from: 98S      
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 01/08/1970 D3783 Transfer in from: 9A Longsight    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 31/10/1970 D4139 Transfer in from: 12C Barrow in Furness    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 12/12/1970 D4139 Transfer in from: 8J Allerton    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 26/06/1971 D4117 Transfer in from: 14A Cricklewood East    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 15/04/1972 D3912 Transfer in from: 65A Eastfield