Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 626 Today
» 1269 Yesterday
» 8965 Week
» 6073 Month
» 113019 Year
» 1334584 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Low Moor


Type Class Wheels Period Date Number Event Code Depot Length of Stay Notes
Steam Crab 2-6-0 4w/e 22/06/1946 2732 Transfer in from:        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 24/11/1947 2296 1st Allocation        
Steam Crab 2-6-0 w/e 29/11/1947 2843 Transfer in from: 24F Fleetwood    
Steam Crab 2-6-0 w/e 29/11/1947 2865 Transfer in from:        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 01/12/1947 2297 1st Allocation        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 05/12/1947 2298 1st Allocation        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 11/12/1947 2299 1st Allocation        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 17/12/1947 2187 1st Allocation        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 22/12/1947 2188 1st Allocation        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 24/12/1947 2189 1st Allocation        
Steam 1008 2-4-2T 01/01/1948 10715 Snapshot        
Steam 1008 2-4-2T 01/01/1948 10762 Snapshot        
Steam 1008 2-4-2T 01/01/1948 10788 Snapshot        
Steam 1008 2-4-2T 01/01/1948 10840 Snapshot        
Steam 1008 2-4-2T 01/01/1948 10855 Snapshot        
Steam 1008 2-4-2T 01/01/1948 10886 Snapshot        
Steam 18 2-4-2T 01/01/1948 10909 Snapshot        
Steam Compound 4-4-0 01/01/1948 1186 Snapshot        
Steam Compound 4-4-0 01/01/1948 1189 Snapshot        
Steam 27 0-6-0 01/01/1948 12104 Snapshot        
Steam 27 0-6-0 01/01/1948 12217 Snapshot        
Steam 27 0-6-0 01/01/1948 12237 Snapshot        
Steam 27 0-6-0 01/01/1948 12255 Snapshot        
Steam 27 0-6-0 01/01/1948 12410 Snapshot        
Steam 27 0-6-0 01/01/1948 12427 Snapshot        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 01/01/1948 2187 Snapshot 25F Low Moor    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 01/01/1948 2187 Snapshot 25F Low Moor    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 01/01/1948 2188 Snapshot 25F Low Moor    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 01/01/1948 2188 Snapshot 25F Low Moor    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 01/01/1948 2189 Snapshot 25F Low Moor    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 01/01/1948 2189 Snapshot 25F Low Moor    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 01/01/1948 2296 Snapshot 25F Low Moor    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 01/01/1948 2296 Snapshot 25F Low Moor    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 01/01/1948 2297 Snapshot 25F Low Moor    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 01/01/1948 2297 Snapshot 25F Low Moor    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 01/01/1948 2298 Snapshot 25F Low Moor    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 01/01/1948 2298 Snapshot 25F Low Moor    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 01/01/1948 2299 Snapshot 25F Low Moor    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 01/01/1948 2299 Snapshot 25F Low Moor    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 01/01/1948 2406 Snapshot        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 01/01/1948 2407 Snapshot        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 01/01/1948 2409 Snapshot        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 01/01/1948 2644 Snapshot        
Steam Crab 2-6-0 01/01/1948 2726 Snapshot        
Steam Crab 2-6-0 01/01/1948 2727 Snapshot        
Steam Crab 2-6-0 01/01/1948 2728 Snapshot        
Steam Crab 2-6-0 01/01/1948 2828 Snapshot        
Steam Crab 2-6-0 01/01/1948 2843 Snapshot 25F Low Moor    
Steam Crab 2-6-0 01/01/1948 2843 Snapshot 25F Low Moor    
Steam Crab 2-6-0 01/01/1948 2865 Snapshot 25F Low Moor    
Steam Crab 2-6-0 01/01/1948 2865 Snapshot 25F Low Moor    
Steam Crab 2-6-0 01/01/1948 42732 Snapshot 25F Low Moor    
Steam Crab 2-6-0 01/01/1948 42732 Snapshot 25F Low Moor    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 01/01/1948 4912 Snapshot        
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 01/01/1948 5062 Snapshot        
Steam 1008 2-4-2T 01/01/1948 50665 Snapshot        
Steam 18 2-4-2T 01/01/1948 50952 Snapshot        
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 01/01/1948 5201 Snapshot        
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 01/01/1948 5207 Snapshot        
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 01/01/1948 5208 Snapshot        
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 01/01/1948 5209 Snapshot        
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 01/01/1948 5210 Snapshot        
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 01/01/1948 5211 Snapshot        
Steam 27 0-6-0 01/01/1948 52127 Snapshot        
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 01/01/1948 5221 Snapshot        
Steam 27 0-6-0 01/01/1948 52403 Snapshot        
Steam 27 0-6-0 01/01/1948 52422 Snapshot        
Steam 1008 2-4-2T w/e 17/01/1948 10715 Transfer out to: 25A Wakefield    
Steam 1008 2-4-2T w/e 17/01/1948 10762 Transfer out to: 25D Mirfield    
Steam 1008 2-4-2T w/e 17/01/1948 10788 Transfer out to: 25A Wakefield    
Steam 1008 2-4-2T w/e 17/01/1948 10840 Transfer out to: 23C Southport    
Steam 1008 2-4-2T w/e 17/01/1948 10855 Transfer out to: 23C Southport    
Steam 1008 2-4-2T w/e 17/01/1948 10886 Transfer out to: 23D Wigan Central (L&Y)    
Steam 1008 2-4-2T w/e 17/01/1948 50665 Transfer out to:        
Steam 1008 2-4-2T w/e 21/02/1948 10715 Transfer in from: 25A Wakefield    
Steam 1008 2-4-2T w/e 21/02/1948 10788 Transfer in from: 25A Wakefield    
Steam 1008 2-4-2T w/e 21/02/1948 50813 Transfer in from: 25A Wakefield    
Steam 27 0-6-0 w/e 06/03/1948 52422 Condemned      
Steam 1008 2-4-2T w/e 08/05/1948 10788 Transfer out to: 25A Wakefield    
Steam 1008 2-4-2T w/e 08/05/1948 50813 Transfer out to: 25A Wakefield    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 15/05/1948 4946 Transfer in from: 23A Bank Hall    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 15/05/1948 4982 Transfer in from: 23A Bank Hall    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 15/05/1948 5062 Transfer out to: 23A Bank Hall    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 15/05/1948 5209 Transfer out to: 23A Bank Hall    
Steam 28 0-6-0 w/e 28/05/1948 12549 Transfer in from: 26B Agecroft    
Steam 18 2-4-2T w/e 19/06/1948 50952 Condemned      
Steam 27 0-6-0 w/e 19/06/1948 52127 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 22/06/1948 42156 1st Allocation        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 29/06/1948 42157 1st Allocation        
Steam 27 0-6-0 w/e 31/07/1948 12309 Transfer in from: 24B Rose Grove    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 14/08/1948 5043 Transfer in from:        
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 02/10/1948 5221 Transfer out to: 23C Southport    
Steam Compound 4-4-0 3w/e 11/12/1948 1189 Transfer out to: 26C Bolton    
Steam 23 0-6-0ST 5w/e 16/07/1949 51429 Transfer in from: 25E Sowerby Bridge    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 5w/e 16/07/1949 42156 Transfer out to: 5D Stoke    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 5w/e 16/07/1949 42157 Transfer out to: 5D Stoke    
Steam 23 0-6-0ST w/e 19/11/1949 51429 Transfer out to: 25E Sowerby Bridge    
Steam 27 0-6-0 w/e 10/12/1949 52403 Condemned      
Steam Crab 2-6-0 w/e 17/12/1949 42843 Transfer out to: 24A Accrington    
Steam 27 0-6-0 w/e 17/12/1949 52255 Transfer out to: 25D Mirfield    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 2w/e 17/06/1950 45043 Transfer out to: 28A Blackpool Central    
Steam Crab 2-6-0 4w/e 07/10/1950 42828 Transfer out to: 24B Rose Grove    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 m/e 11/1950 44693 1st Allocation        
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 m/e 11/1950 44694 1st Allocation        
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4w/e 04/11/1950 45210 Transfer out to: 25B Huddersfield    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4w/e 04/11/1950 45211 Transfer out to: 26A Newton Heath    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 30/11/1950 44695 1st Allocation        
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4w/e 02/12/1950 45219 Transfer in from: 25B Huddersfield    
Steam 27 0-6-0 4w/e 02/12/1950 52427 Transfer out to: 26C Bolton    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4w/e 31/12/1950 45210 Transfer in from: 25B Huddersfield    
Steam Crab 2-6-0 4w/e 31/12/1950 42726 Transfer out to: 27B Aintree    
Steam Crab 2-6-0 4w/e 31/12/1950 42727 Transfer out to: 27B Aintree    
Steam Crab 2-6-0 4w/e 31/12/1950 42728 Transfer out to: 27B Aintree    
Steam Crab 2-6-0 4w/e 31/12/1950 42865 Transfer out to: 25D Mirfield    
Steam 1008 2-4-2T 4w/e 24/02/1951 50715 Transfer out to: 25E Sowerby Bridge    
Steam 18 2-4-2T m/e 03/1951 50909 Condemned      
Steam Compound 4-4-0 4w/e 16/06/1951 41186 Transfer out to: 27D Wigan Central (L&Y)    
Steam 1008 2-4-2T 4w/e 17/07/1951 50736 Transfer in from: 26A Newton Heath    
Steam 1008 2-4-2T 4w/e 17/07/1951 50886 Transfer in from: 23D Wigan Central (L&Y)    
Steam 28 0-6-0 4w/e 17/07/1951 52561 Transfer in from: 25A Wakefield    
Steam 27 0-6-0 4w/e 11/08/1951 52166 Transfer in from: 25D Mirfield    
Steam Crab 2-6-0 4w/e 08/09/1951 42732 Transfer out to: 27B Aintree    
Steam 27 0-6-0 4w/e 06/10/1951 52515 Transfer in from: 25D Mirfield    
Steam 1008 2-4-2T m/e 12/1951 50736 Condemned      
Steam 1008 2-4-2T m/e 12/1951 50886 Condemned      
Steam 27 0-6-0 4w/e 29/12/1951 52351 Transfer in from: 25E Sowerby Bridge    
Steam 1008 2-4-2T 4w/e 26/01/1952 50892 Transfer in from: 25D Mirfield    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4w/e 19/04/1952 45210 Transfer out to: 25G Farnley Junction    
Steam 1008 2-4-2T m/e 05/1952 50892 Condemned      
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 8w/e 14/06/1952 45210 Transfer in from: 25G Farnley Junction    
Steam 1008 2-4-2T 8w/e 14/06/1952 50818 Transfer in from: 26A Newton Heath    
Steam 27 0-6-0 8w/e 14/06/1952 52411 Transfer in from: 25C Goole    
Steam 28 0-6-0 8w/e 14/06/1952 52549 Transfer out to: 26F Lees (Oldham)    
Steam 1008 2-4-2T 4w/e 12/07/1952 50762 Transfer in from: 25D Mirfield    
Steam 1008 2-4-2T 4w/e 12/07/1952 50807 Transfer in from: 26C Bolton    
Steam 1008 2-4-2T 4w/e 12/07/1952 50831 Transfer in from: 24C Lostock Hall    
Steam 1008 2-4-2T 4w/e 12/07/1952 50865 Transfer in from: 23C Southport    
Steam 27 0-6-0 4w/e 12/07/1952 52237 Transfer out to: 25C Goole    
Steam 28 0-6-0 4w/e 12/07/1952 52561 Transfer out to: 25C Goole    
Steam 1008 2-4-2T 4w/e 06/09/1952 50865 Transfer out to: 25B Huddersfield    
Steam 28 0-6-0 4w/e 04/10/1952 52561 Transfer in from: 25C Goole    
Steam 27 0-6-0 5w/e 03/01/1953 52237 Transfer in from: 25C Goole    
Steam 1008 2-4-2T 4w/e 21/03/1953 50764 Transfer in from: 24C Lostock Hall    
Steam Compound 4-4-0 4w/e 18/04/1953 40937 Transfer in from: 27E Walton on the Hill    
Steam Compound 4-4-0 4w/e 18/04/1953 41101 Transfer in from: 27E Walton on the Hill    
Steam Compound 4-4-0 4w/e 18/04/1953 41189 Transfer in from: 27E Walton on the Hill    
Steam 27 0-6-0 4w/e 16/05/1953 52410 Transfer out to: 25E Sowerby Bridge    
Steam Compound 4-4-0 8w/e 11/07/1953 40937 Transfer out to: 24E Blackpool Central    
Steam Compound 4-4-0 8w/e 11/07/1953 41101 Transfer out to: 26C Bolton    
Steam Compound 4-4-0 8w/e 11/07/1953 41189 Transfer out to: 26C Bolton    
Steam 27 0-6-0 4w/e 08/08/1953 52427 Transfer in from: 26D Bury    
Steam 27 0-6-0 4w/e 08/08/1953 52237 Transfer out to: 26D Bury    
Steam 27 0-6-0 4w/e 05/09/1953 52411 Transfer out to: 25A Wakefield    
Steam Standard Class 2 Tank 2-6-2T 08/09/1953 84010 1st Allocation        
Steam Standard Class 2 Tank 2-6-2T 17/09/1953 84012 1st Allocation        
Steam Standard Class 2 Tank 2-6-2T 18/09/1953 84011 1st Allocation        
Steam Standard Class 2 Tank 2-6-2T 21/09/1953 84013 1st Allocation        
Steam Standard Class 2 Tank 2-6-2T 22/09/1953 84014 1st Allocation        
Steam Standard Class 2 Tank 2-6-2T 02/10/1953 84015 1st Allocation        
Steam 27 0-6-0 4w/e 03/10/1953 52343 Transfer in from: 26A Newton Heath    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4w/e 03/10/1953 44982 Transfer out to: 24E Blackpool Central    
Steam 1008 2-4-2T 4w/e 31/10/1953 50869 Transfer in from: 25D Mirfield    
Steam 27 0-6-0 4w/e 31/10/1953 52355 Transfer in from: 26A Newton Heath    
Steam 27 0-6-0 4w/e 31/10/1953 52427 Transfer out to: 26F Lees (Oldham)    
Steam 1008 2-4-2T m/e 12/1953 50762 Condemned      
Steam 27 0-6-0 m/e 01/1954 52309 Condemned      
Steam Compound 4-4-0 4w/e 24/04/1954 41101 Transfer in from: 26C Bolton    
Steam Compound 4-4-0 4w/e 24/04/1954 41186 Transfer in from: 27B Aintree    
Steam Compound 4-4-0 4w/e 24/04/1954 41187 Transfer in from: 27B Aintree    
Steam Compound 4-4-0 4w/e 24/04/1954 41189 Transfer in from: 26C Bolton    
Steam 1008 2-4-2T 4w/e 24/04/1954 50757 Transfer in from: 25E Sowerby Bridge    
Steam 27 0-6-0 4w/e 24/04/1954 52154 Transfer in from: 25E Sowerby Bridge    
Steam 1008 2-4-2T 4w/e 24/04/1954 50818 Transfer out to: 25E Sowerby Bridge    
Steam 27 0-6-0 4w/e 24/04/1954 52351 Transfer out to: 25E Sowerby Bridge    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 8w/e 19/06/1954 41250 Transfer in from: 25G Farnley Junction    
Steam Compound 4-4-0 8w/e 19/06/1954 41101 Transfer out to: 27C Southport    
Steam Compound 4-4-0 8w/e 19/06/1954 41186 Transfer out to: 27C Southport    
Steam Compound 4-4-0 8w/e 19/06/1954 41187 Transfer out to: 27C Southport    
Steam Compound 4-4-0 8w/e 19/06/1954 41189 Transfer out to: 27C Southport    
Steam 27 0-6-0 4w/e 17/07/1954 52154 Transfer out to: 25A Wakefield    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 11/09/1954 41262 Transfer in from: 24E Blackpool Central    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 11/09/1954 41263 Transfer in from: 28A Blackpool Central    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 11/09/1954 41264 Transfer in from: 28A Blackpool Central    
Steam 27 0-6-0 4w/e 11/09/1954 52104 Transfer out to: 25D Mirfield    
Steam Standard Class 2 Tank 2-6-2T 4w/e 25/09/1954 84010 Transfer out to: 26F Lees (Oldham)    
Steam Standard Class 2 Tank 2-6-2T 4w/e 25/09/1954 84015 Transfer out to: 26F Lees (Oldham)    
Steam 1008 2-4-2T 4w/e 09/10/1954 50757 Transfer out to: 25E Sowerby Bridge    
Steam 1008 2-4-2T 4w/e 09/10/1954 50831 Transfer out to: 25B Huddersfield    
Steam Standard Class 2 Tank 2-6-2T 4w/e 09/10/1954 84012 Transfer out to: 26F Lees (Oldham)    
Steam 27 0-6-0 4w/e 29/01/1955 12120 Transfer in from: 25D Mirfield    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 29/01/1955 42649 Transfer in from: 26D Bury    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 29/01/1955 42650 Transfer in from: 26D Bury    
Steam 27 0-6-0 4w/e 29/01/1955 52150 Transfer in from: 25A Wakefield    
Steam 27 0-6-0 4w/e 29/01/1955 52235 Transfer in from: 25A Wakefield    
Steam Standard Class 2 Tank 2-6-2T 4w/e 29/01/1955 84011 Transfer out to: 27A Bank Hall    
Steam Standard Class 2 Tank 2-6-2T 4w/e 29/01/1955 84013 Transfer out to: 27A Bank Hall    
Steam Standard Class 2 Tank 2-6-2T 4w/e 29/01/1955 84014 Transfer out to: 27A Bank Hall    
Steam 28 0-6-0 m/e 02/1955 52561 Condemned      
Steam 27 0-6-0 m/e 03/1955 52150 Condemned      
Steam 1008 2-4-2T m/e 05/1955 50807 Condemned      
Steam 1008 2-4-2T 4w/e 21/05/1955 50757 Transfer in from: 25E Sowerby Bridge    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4w/e 13/08/1955 45435 Transfer in from:        
Steam 1008 2-4-2T m/e 11/1955 50869 Condemned      
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4w/e 05/11/1955 45435 Transfer out to: 25A Wakefield    
Steam 1008 2-4-2T 4w/e 03/12/1955 50831 Transfer in from: 25B Huddersfield    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4w/e 25/02/1956 45101 Transfer in from: 24A Accrington    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 24/03/1956 42407 Transfer out to: 25C Goole    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T m/e 16/06/1956 42622 Transfer in from: 26A Newton Heath    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 m/e 16/06/1956 90397 Transfer in from: 25A Wakefield    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 m/e 16/06/1956 90406 Transfer in from: 25A Wakefield    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 m/e 16/06/1956 45101 Transfer out to: 25A Wakefield    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 m/e 16/06/1956 45201 Transfer out to: 27A Bank Hall    
Steam 1008 2-4-2T m/e 07/1956 50764 Condemned      
Steam 27 0-6-0 m/e 08/1956 52343 Condemned      
Steam 1008 2-4-2T 4w/e 08/09/1956 50855 Transfer in from: 26C Bolton    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4w/e 08/09/1956 45210 Transfer out to: 27A Bank Hall    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 20/10/1956 90126 Transfer in from: 26A Newton Heath    
Steam 27 0-6-0 27/10/1956 52166 Condemned      
Steam 27 0-6-0 5w/e 20/04/1957 52089 Transfer in from: 26A Newton Heath    
Steam 27 0-6-0 m/e 07/1957 52217 Condemned      
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 5w/e 20/07/1957 47249 Transfer in from: 20B Stourton    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 5w/e 20/07/1957 47335 Transfer in from: 20D Normanton    
Steam 27 0-6-0 5w/e 20/07/1957 52413 Transfer in from: 24D Lower Darwen    
Steam 27 0-6-0 5w/e 20/07/1957 52461 Transfer in from: 26C Bolton    
Steam 27 0-6-0 5w/e 20/07/1957 12120 Transfer out to: 56D Mirfield    
Steam 27 0-6-0 m/e 08/1957 52235 Condemned      
Steam 27 0-6-0 4w/e 10/08/1957 52413 Transfer out to: 24B Rose Grove    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 4w/e 21/09/1957 43101 Transfer in from: 56B Ardsley    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 21/09/1957 44062 Transfer in from: 25D Mirfield    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 4w/e 21/09/1957 47249 Transfer out to: 56E Sowerby Bridge    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 19/10/1957 40155 Transfer in from: 56A Wakefield    
Steam B1 4-6-0 12/01/1958 61031 Transfer in from: 37C Bradford Hammerton Street    
Steam B1 4-6-0 12/01/1958 61131 Transfer in from: 56G Bradford Hammerton Street    
Steam B1 4-6-0 12/01/1958 61382 Transfer in from: 56G Bradford Hammerton Street    
Steam B1 4-6-0 12/01/1958 61383 Transfer in from: 56G Bradford Hammerton Street    
Steam J39 0-6-0 12/01/1958 64791 Transfer in from: 56G Bradford Hammerton Street    
Steam J39 0-6-0 12/01/1958 64796 Transfer in from: 56G Bradford Hammerton Street    
Steam J39 0-6-0 12/01/1958 64801 Transfer in from: 37C Bradford Hammerton Street    
Steam J39 0-6-0 12/01/1958 64872 Transfer in from: 56G Bradford Hammerton Street    
Steam J39 0-6-0 12/01/1958 64886 Transfer in from: 56G Bradford Hammerton Street    
Steam J39 0-6-0 12/01/1958 64903 Transfer in from: 37C Bradford Hammerton Street    
Steam J39 0-6-0 12/01/1958 64907 Transfer in from: 37C Bradford Hammerton Street    
Steam J39 0-6-0 12/01/1958 64947 Transfer in from: 56G Bradford Hammerton Street    
Steam J6 0-6-0 4w/e 08/02/1958 64170 Transfer in from: BFD Bradford Hammerton Street    
Steam J6 0-6-0 4w/e 08/02/1958 64203 Transfer in from: BFD Bradford Hammerton Street    
Steam J6 0-6-0 4w/e 08/02/1958 64226 Transfer in from: BFD Bradford Hammerton Street    
Steam J50 0-6-0T 4w/e 08/02/1958 68892 Transfer in from: BFD Bradford Hammerton Street    
Steam J50 0-6-0T 4w/e 08/02/1958 68895 Transfer in from: 56G Bradford Hammerton Street    
Steam J50 0-6-0T 4w/e 08/02/1958 68897 Transfer in from: BFD Bradford Hammerton Street    
Steam J50 0-6-0T 4w/e 08/02/1958 68908 Transfer in from: BFD Bradford Hammerton Street    
Steam J50 0-6-0T 4w/e 08/02/1958 68912 Transfer in from: BFD Bradford Hammerton Street    
Steam J50 0-6-0T 4w/e 08/02/1958 68922 Transfer in from: BFD Bradford Hammerton Street    
Steam J50 0-6-0T 4w/e 08/02/1958 68923 Transfer in from: BFD Bradford Hammerton Street    
Steam J50 0-6-0T 4w/e 08/02/1958 68932 Transfer in from: BFD Bradford Hammerton Street    
Steam J50 0-6-0T 4w/e 08/02/1958 68933 Transfer in from: BFD Bradford Hammerton Street    
Steam J50 0-6-0T 4w/e 08/02/1958 68934 Transfer in from: BFD Bradford Hammerton Street    
Steam J50 0-6-0T 4w/e 08/02/1958 68940 Transfer in from: BFD Bradford Hammerton Street    
Steam J50 0-6-0T 4w/e 08/02/1958 68942 Transfer in from: BFD Bradford Hammerton Street    
Steam J50 0-6-0T 4w/e 08/02/1958 68943 Transfer in from: BFD Bradford Hammerton Street    
Steam J50 0-6-0T 4w/e 08/02/1958 68944 Transfer in from: 36A Doncaster    
Steam J50 0-6-0T 4w/e 08/02/1958 68969 Transfer in from: BFD Bradford Hammerton Street    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 08/02/1958 90698 Transfer in from: 56G Bradford Hammerton Street    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 08/03/1958 41253 Transfer in from: 25A Wakefield    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 4w/e 08/03/1958 46483 Transfer in from: 25A Wakefield    
Steam J6 0-6-0 4w/e 08/03/1958 64203 Transfer out to: 56A Wakefield    
Steam J50 0-6-0T 4w/e 08/03/1958 68897 Transfer out to: 51A Darlington (Bank Top)    
Steam J50 0-6-0T 4w/e 08/03/1958 68912 Transfer out to: 53A Hull Dairycoates    
Steam J50 0-6-0T 4w/e 08/03/1958 68934 Transfer out to: 51A Darlington (Bank Top)    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 4w/e 10/05/1958 47405 Transfer in from: 20D Normanton    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 4w/e 10/05/1958 47446 Transfer in from: 20D Normanton    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 4w/e 10/05/1958 47635 Transfer in from: 20D Normanton    
Steam J50 0-6-0T 4w/e 10/05/1958 68892 Transfer out to: 51E Stockton    
Steam J50 0-6-0T 4w/e 10/05/1958 68908 Transfer out to: 51D Middlesbrough    
Steam J50 0-6-0T 4w/e 10/05/1958 68942 Transfer out to: 51D Middlesbrough    
Steam B1 4-6-0 08/06/1958 61020 Transfer in from: 51A Darlington (Bank Top)    
Steam B1 4-6-0 08/06/1958 61023 Transfer in from: 51A Darlington (Bank Top)    
Steam B1 4-6-0 08/06/1958 61039 Transfer in from: 51A Darlington (Bank Top)    
Steam B1 4-6-0 08/06/1958 61040 Transfer in from: 51A Darlington (Bank Top)    
Steam B1 4-6-0 08/06/1958 61049 Transfer in from: 51A Darlington (Bank Top)    
Steam B1 4-6-0 08/06/1958 61061 Transfer in from: 51A Darlington (Bank Top)    
Steam J39 0-6-0 08/06/1958 64947 Transfer out to: 53A Hull Dairycoates    
Steam 3F 0-6-0 5w/e 14/06/1958 43579 Transfer in from: 56A Wakefield    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 5w/e 14/06/1958 48080 Transfer in from: 20C Royston    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 5w/e 14/06/1958 48162 Transfer in from: 20C Royston    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 5w/e 14/06/1958 48265 Transfer in from: 20C Royston    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 5w/e 14/06/1958 48394 Transfer in from: 56A Wakefield    
Steam J6 0-6-0 5w/e 14/06/1958 64203 Transfer in from: 56A Wakefield    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 5w/e 14/06/1958 90711 Transfer in from: 56B Ardsley    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 5w/e 14/06/1958 43101 Transfer out to: 56B Ardsley    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 5w/e 14/06/1958 47335 Transfer out to: 56D Mirfield    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 5w/e 14/06/1958 90126 Transfer out to: 51A Darlington (Bank Top)    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 5w/e 14/06/1958 90397 Transfer out to: 51A Darlington (Bank Top)    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 5w/e 14/06/1958 90406 Transfer out to: 51A Darlington (Bank Top)    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 5w/e 14/06/1958 90698 Transfer out to: 51A Darlington (Bank Top)    
Steam 1008 2-4-2T m/e 09/1958 50855 Condemned      
Steam J50 0-6-0T m/e 09/1958 68940 Condemned      
Steam B1 4-6-0 14/09/1958 61031 Transfer out to: 51A Darlington (Bank Top)    
Steam B1 4-6-0 14/09/1958 61061 Transfer out to: 51A Darlington (Bank Top)    
Steam B1 4-6-0 14/09/1958 61382 Transfer out to: 51A Darlington (Bank Top)    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 11/10/1958 40155 Transfer out to: 56B Ardsley    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 11/10/1958 41264 Transfer out to: 56A Wakefield    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 11/10/1958 48162 Transfer out to: 55B Stourton    
Steam 27 0-6-0 4w/e 11/10/1958 52355 Transfer out to: 56A Wakefield    
Steam 1008 2-4-2T m/e 11/1958 50757 Condemned      
Steam 1008 2-4-2T m/e 11/1958 50831 Condemned      
Steam 8F 2-8-0 5w/e 15/11/1958 48702 Transfer in from: 56D Mirfield    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 5w/e 15/11/1958 90333 Transfer in from:        
Steam 8F 2-8-0 5w/e 15/11/1958 48265 Transfer out to: 56D Mirfield    
Steam J39 0-6-0 25/01/1959 64817 Transfer in from: 54A Sunderland    
Steam J39 0-6-0 25/01/1959 64919 Transfer in from: 54A Sunderland    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 31/01/1959 42073 Transfer in from: 50B Neville Hill    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 31/01/1959 42411 Transfer in from: 50B Neville Hill    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 31/01/1959 47255 Transfer in from: 20E Manningham    
Steam J50 0-6-0T w/e 31/01/1959 68908 Transfer in from: 51L Thornaby    
Steam J50 0-6-0T w/e 31/01/1959 68912 Transfer in from: 53E Goole    
Steam B1 4-6-0 01/03/1959 61131 Transfer out to: 56A Wakefield    
Steam B1 4-6-0 15/03/1959 61040 Transfer out to: 56A Wakefield    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 21/03/1959 44824 Transfer in from: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 27 0-6-0 w/e 21/03/1959 52089 Transfer out to: 56D Mirfield    
Steam 27 0-6-0 w/e 21/03/1959 52515 Transfer out to: 56D Mirfield    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 11/04/1959 42084 Transfer in from: 50G Whitby    
Steam B1 4-6-0 14/06/1959 61198 Transfer in from: DAR Darlington (Bank Top)    
Steam B1 4-6-0 14/06/1959 61274 Transfer in from: 51A Darlington (Bank Top)    
Steam B1 4-6-0 14/06/1959 61387 Transfer in from: 51A Darlington (Bank Top)    
Steam K1 2-6-0 14/06/1959 62047 Transfer in from: 51E Stockton    
Steam K1 2-6-0 14/06/1959 62065 Transfer in from: 51E Stockton    
Steam J39 0-6-0 14/06/1959 64796 Transfer out to: 56B Ardsley    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T w/e 20/06/1959 41274 Transfer in from: 20C Royston    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 20/06/1959 42311 Transfer in from: 56E Sowerby Bridge    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 20/06/1959 42380 Transfer in from: 56E Sowerby Bridge    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 20/06/1959 43053 Transfer in from:        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 20/06/1959 42187 Transfer out to: 24C Lostock Hall    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 11/07/1959 46483 Transfer out to: 56A Wakefield    
Steam B1 4-6-0 30/08/1959 61198 Transfer out to: 50A York (North)    
Steam K1 2-6-0 30/08/1959 62047 Transfer out to: 50A York (North)    
Steam K1 2-6-0 30/08/1959 62065 Transfer out to: 50A York (North)    
Steam J50 0-6-0T m/e 09/1959 68912 Condemned      
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 12/09/1959 44824 Transfer out to: 55A Holbeck (MR)    
Steam J50 0-6-0T w/e 03/10/1959 68948 Transfer in from: 56C Copley Hill (Leeds)    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 10/10/1959 42380 Transfer out to: 56E Sowerby Bridge    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 10/10/1959 42411 Transfer out to: 56E Sowerby Bridge    
Steam 3F 0-6-0 w/e 31/10/1959 43579 Transfer out to: 56A Wakefield    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 07/11/1959 42409 Transfer out to: 55A Holbeck (MR)    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 07/11/1959 43053 Transfer out to: 51C West Hartlepool    
Steam B1 4-6-0 08/11/1959 61020 Transfer out to: 56A Wakefield    
Steam B1 4-6-0 08/11/1959 61023 Transfer out to: 56B Ardsley    
Steam B1 4-6-0 08/11/1959 61039 Transfer out to: 56B Ardsley    
Steam B1 4-6-0 08/11/1959 61049 Transfer out to: 56D Mirfield    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 14/11/1959 46413 Transfer in from: 25A Wakefield    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 14/11/1959 46435 Transfer in from: 25A Wakefield    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 w/e 14/11/1959 90068 Transfer in from: 56A Wakefield    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 w/e 14/11/1959 90200 Transfer in from: 56A Wakefield    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 w/e 14/11/1959 90236 Transfer in from: 56A Wakefield    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 14/11/1959 42073 Transfer out to: 56A Wakefield    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 14/11/1959 42622 Transfer out to: 56A Wakefield    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 14/11/1959 42649 Transfer out to: 56C Copley Hill (Leeds)    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 14/11/1959 42650 Transfer out to: 56C Copley Hill (Leeds)    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 28/11/1959 42296 Transfer out to: 87E Landore    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 w/e 23/01/1960 90322 Transfer in from: 56D Mirfield    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 w/e 23/01/1960 90351 Transfer in from: 56D Mirfield    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 w/e 23/01/1960 90397 Transfer in from: 56D Mirfield    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 23/01/1960 48080 Transfer out to: 55B Stourton    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 23/01/1960 48394 Transfer out to: 55B Stourton    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 23/01/1960 48702 Transfer out to: 55B Stourton    
Steam J50 0-6-0T m/e 02/1960 68969 Condemned      
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T w/e 06/02/1960 41262 Transfer out to: 50B Hull Dairycoates    
Steam J50 0-6-0T m/e 03/1960 68895 Condemned      
Steam J50 0-6-0T w/e 07/05/1960 68959 Transfer in from: 56A Wakefield    
Steam J50 0-6-0T w/e 07/05/1960 68933 Transfer out to: 56A Wakefield    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T w/e 18/06/1960 40147 Transfer in from: 56E Sowerby Bridge    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T w/e 18/06/1960 40190 Transfer in from: 56E Sowerby Bridge    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T w/e 18/06/1960 41264 Transfer in from: 56D Mirfield    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 18/06/1960 42324 Transfer in from: 56D Mirfield    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 18/06/1960 42380 Transfer in from: 56E Sowerby Bridge    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 18/06/1960 42411 Transfer in from: 56E Sowerby Bridge    
Steam J50 0-6-0T m/e 09/1960 68944 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 10/09/1960 42622 Transfer in from: 56A Wakefield    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 17/09/1960 42188 Transfer out to: 55H Neville Hill    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 17/09/1960 42189 Transfer out to: 55F Manningham    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 01/10/1960 47271 Transfer in from: 56A Wakefield    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 01/10/1960 47582 Transfer in from: 25A Wakefield    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 01/10/1960 47255 Transfer out to: 56A Wakefield    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 01/10/1960 47405 Transfer out to: 56A Wakefield    
Steam J6 0-6-0 w/e 01/10/1960 64170 Transfer out to: 56B Ardsley    
Steam J6 0-6-0 w/e 01/10/1960 64203 Transfer out to: 56C Copley Hill (Leeds)    
Steam J6 0-6-0 w/e 01/10/1960 64226 Transfer out to: 56B Ardsley    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T m/e 12/1960 47271 Condemned      
Steam 3F 0-6-0T m/e 12/1960 47446 Condemned      
Steam 3F 0-6-0T m/e 12/1960 47635 Condemned      
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 03/12/1960 46413 Transfer out to: 56A Wakefield    
Steam 27 0-6-0 w/e 03/12/1960 52461 Transfer out to: 56A Wakefield    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 10/12/1960 47582 Transfer out to: 24D Lower Darwen    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 10/12/1960 42380 Condemned      
Steam 3P 2-6-2T w/e 14/01/1961 40074 Transfer in from: 56C Copley Hill (Leeds)    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 14/01/1961 42411 Transfer out to: 56C Copley Hill (Leeds)    
Steam J50 0-6-0T m/e 02/1961 68943 Condemned      
Steam 27 0-6-0 w/e 17/06/1961 52121 Transfer in from: 25D Mirfield    
Steam 27 0-6-0 w/e 17/06/1961 52515 Transfer in from: 56D Mirfield    
Steam K3 2-6-0 w/e 17/06/1961 61853 Transfer in from: 56B Ardsley    
Steam K3 2-6-0 w/e 17/06/1961 61975 Transfer in from: 56B Ardsley    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 w/e 17/06/1961 90200 Transfer out to: 56E Sowerby Bridge    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T w/e 24/06/1961 40074 Transfer out to: 56A Wakefield    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T w/e 24/06/1961 40147 Transfer out to: 56A Wakefield    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T w/e 24/06/1961 40190 Transfer out to: 56A Wakefield    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 08/07/1961 48265 Transfer in from: 56D Mirfield    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 08/07/1961 48276 Transfer in from: 56D Mirfield    
Steam J50 0-6-0T m/e 08/1961 68959 Condemned      
Steam B1 4-6-0 20/08/1961 61040 Transfer in from: 56D Mirfield    
Steam B1 4-6-0 20/08/1961 61161 Transfer in from: 56D Mirfield    
Steam B1 4-6-0 20/08/1961 61189 Transfer in from: 56C Copley Hill (Leeds)    
Steam B1 4-6-0 20/08/1961 61386 Transfer in from: 37B Copley Hill (Leeds)    
Steam J50 0-6-0T w/e 26/08/1961 68977 Transfer in from: 56C Copley Hill (Leeds)    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 26/08/1961 44912 Transfer out to: 56C Copley Hill (Leeds)    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 26/08/1961 45207 Transfer out to: 56D Mirfield    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 26/08/1961 45208 Transfer out to: 56D Mirfield    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 26/08/1961 45219 Transfer out to: 56C Copley Hill (Leeds)    
Steam J50 0-6-0T w/e 26/08/1961 68932 Transfer out to: 56C Copley Hill (Leeds)    
Steam K3 2-6-0 04/09/1961 61975 Condemned      
Steam B1 4-6-0 10/09/1961 61040 Transfer out to: 56A Wakefield    
Steam B1 4-6-0 10/09/1961 61161 Transfer out to: 56A Wakefield    
Steam Royal Scot 4-6-0 w/e 16/09/1961 46109 Transfer in from: 20A Holbeck (MR)    
Steam Royal Scot 4-6-0 w/e 16/09/1961 46113 Transfer in from: 20A Holbeck (MR)    
Steam Royal Scot 4-6-0 w/e 16/09/1961 46117 Transfer in from: 20A Holbeck (MR)    
Steam Royal Scot 4-6-0 w/e 16/09/1961 46130 Transfer in from: 55A Holbeck (MR)    
Steam Royal Scot 4-6-0 w/e 16/09/1961 46145 Transfer in from: 20A Holbeck (MR)    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 16/09/1961 48265 Transfer out to: 56D Mirfield    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 16/09/1961 48276 Transfer out to: 56D Mirfield    
Steam K3 2-6-0 w/e 16/09/1961 61853 Transfer out to: 56B Ardsley    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 w/e 16/09/1961 90068 Transfer out to: 56D Mirfield    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 w/e 16/09/1961 90236 Transfer out to: 56D Mirfield    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 w/e 16/09/1961 90322 Transfer out to: 56D Mirfield    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 w/e 16/09/1961 90333 Transfer out to: 56D Mirfield    
Steam J50 0-6-0T 15/11/1961 68948 Condemned      
Steam L1 2-6-4T w/e 25/11/1961 67754 Transfer in from: 51L Thornaby    
Steam L1 2-6-4T w/e 25/11/1961 67759 Transfer in from: 51L Thornaby    
Steam L1 2-6-4T w/e 25/11/1961 67764 Transfer in from: 51L Thornaby    
Steam L1 2-6-4T w/e 02/12/1961 67721 Transfer in from: 9G Gorton    
Steam J50 0-6-0T 13/12/1961 68923 Condemned      
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 16/12/1961 44062 Transfer out to: 56A Wakefield    
Steam J50 0-6-0T w/e 13/01/1962 68963 Transfer in from: 56B Ardsley    
Steam J50 0-6-0T w/e 13/01/1962 68964 Transfer in from: 56B Ardsley    
Steam Royal Scot 4-6-0 w/e 13/01/1962 46113 Transfer out to: 56D Mirfield    
Steam Royal Scot 4-6-0 w/e 13/01/1962 46117 Transfer out to: 56D Mirfield    
Steam Royal Scot 4-6-0 w/e 13/01/1962 46145 Transfer out to: 56D Mirfield    
Steam J50 0-6-0T 13/02/1962 68963 Condemned      
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 w/e 24/02/1962 90721 Transfer in from: 25D Mirfield    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 w/e 24/02/1962 90723 Transfer in from: 25D Mirfield    
Steam 27 0-6-0 w/e 24/02/1962 52121 Transfer out to: 56D Mirfield    
Steam 27 0-6-0 w/e 24/02/1962 52515 Transfer out to: 56D Mirfield    
Steam J39 0-6-0 29/03/1962 64817 Condemned      
Steam J39 0-6-0 13/04/1962 64903 Condemned      
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 23/06/1962 44951 Transfer in from: 56A Wakefield    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 23/06/1962 45207 Transfer in from: 56A Wakefield    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 23/06/1962 45208 Transfer in from: 56A Wakefield    
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 w/e 23/06/1962 45565 Transfer in from: 20A Holbeck (MR)    
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 w/e 23/06/1962 45694 Transfer in from: 20A Holbeck (MR)    
Steam Royal Scot 4-6-0 w/e 23/06/1962 46109 Transfer out to: 55A Holbeck (MR)    
Steam Royal Scot 4-6-0 w/e 23/06/1962 46130 Transfer out to: 55A Holbeck (MR)    
Steam L1 2-6-4T m/e 08/1962 67764 Condemned      
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 25/08/1962 43072 Transfer in from: 56A Wakefield    
Steam J50 0-6-0T 01/10/1962 68964 Condemned      
Steam L1 2-6-4T 08/10/1962 67759 Condemned      
Steam L1 2-6-4T 05/11/1962 67754 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 14/11/1962 42324 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 17/11/1962 42298 Condemned      
Steam J39 0-6-0 18/11/1962 64886 Transfer out to: 56B Ardsley    
Steam J39 0-6-0 26/11/1962 64791 Condemned      
Steam J39 0-6-0 26/11/1962 64801 Condemned      
Steam J39 0-6-0 26/11/1962 64872 Condemned      
Steam J39 0-6-0 26/11/1962 64907 Condemned      
Steam L1 2-6-4T 26/11/1962 67721 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 01/12/1962 42285 Transfer in from: 25D Mirfield    
Steam J39 0-6-0 03/12/1962 64919 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T w/e 08/12/1962 82026 Transfer in from: 50E Scarborough    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 12/12/1962 41263 Condemned      
Steam B1 4-6-0 23/12/1962 61274 Transfer out to: 56A Wakefield    
Steam B1 4-6-0 23/12/1962 61387 Transfer out to: 56A Wakefield    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 29/12/1962 42151 Transfer in from: 25E Sowerby Bridge    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 w/e 29/12/1962 90054 Transfer in from: 56A Wakefield    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 w/e 29/12/1962 90310 Transfer in from: 25E Sowerby Bridge    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 w/e 29/12/1962 90698 Transfer in from: 56D Mirfield    
Steam J50 0-6-0T w/e 29/12/1962 68908 Transfer out to: 56A Wakefield    
Steam J50 0-6-0T w/e 29/12/1962 68922 Transfer out to: 56A Wakefield    
Steam J50 0-6-0T w/e 29/12/1962 68977 Transfer out to: 56A Wakefield    
Steam B1 4-6-0 21/01/1963 61383 Condemned      
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T w/e 02/02/1963 41253 Transfer out to: 55C Farnley Junction    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 21/02/1963 41274 Condemned      
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 30/03/1963 43072 Transfer out to: 56B Ardsley    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T w/e 06/04/1963 41250 Transfer out to: 56C Copley Hill (Leeds)    
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T w/e 06/04/1963 82026 Transfer out to: 56C Copley Hill (Leeds)    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 11/05/1963 42299 Transfer out to: 24J Lancaster Green Ayre    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 22/06/1963 44912 Transfer in from: 56C Copley Hill (Leeds)    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 22/06/1963 45219 Transfer in from: 56C Copley Hill (Leeds)    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 29/06/1963 42406 Transfer out to: 56A Wakefield    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 07/09/1963 42151 Condemned      
Steam B1 4-6-0 08/09/1963 61023 Transfer in from: 56C Copley Hill (Leeds)    
Steam B1 4-6-0 08/09/1963 61115 Transfer in from: 56C Copley Hill (Leeds)    
Steam B1 4-6-0 08/09/1963 61309 Transfer in from: 37B Copley Hill (Leeds)    
Steam B1 4-6-0 08/09/1963 61189 Transfer out to: 56D Mirfield    
Steam B1 4-6-0 08/09/1963 61386 Transfer out to: 56D Mirfield    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 14/09/1963 42311 Transfer out to: 56C Copley Hill (Leeds)    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 14/09/1963 42622 Transfer out to: 56C Copley Hill (Leeds)    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 14/09/1963 44912 Transfer out to: 55D Royston    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 14/09/1963 45207 Transfer out to: 55D Royston    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 14/09/1963 45219 Transfer out to: 55D Royston    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 09/11/1963 42142 Transfer in from: 56B Ardsley    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T w/e 09/11/1963 41264 Transfer out to: 8B Warrington Dallam    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 4w/e 30/11/1963 46435 Transfer out to: 67B Hurlford    
Steam B1 4-6-0 05/01/1964 61023 Transfer out to: 56D Mirfield    
Steam B1 4-6-0 05/01/1964 61115 Transfer out to: 56D Mirfield    
Steam B1 4-6-0 05/01/1964 61309 Transfer out to: 56D Mirfield    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 11/01/1964 42311 Transfer in from: 56C Copley Hill (Leeds)    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 11/01/1964 42411 Transfer in from: 56C Copley Hill (Leeds)    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 11/01/1964 43070 Transfer in from: 56A Wakefield    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 11/01/1964 43132 Transfer in from: 56A Wakefield    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 w/e 11/01/1964 90054 Transfer out to: 56A Wakefield    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 w/e 11/01/1964 90698 Transfer out to: 56A Wakefield    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 w/e 11/01/1964 90721 Transfer out to: 56A Wakefield    
Steam B1 4-6-0 12/04/1964 61016 Transfer in from: 56D Mirfield    
Steam B1 4-6-0 12/04/1964 61023 Transfer in from: 56D Mirfield    
Steam B1 4-6-0 12/04/1964 61115 Transfer in from: 56D Mirfield    
Steam B1 4-6-0 12/04/1964 61189 Transfer in from: 56D Mirfield    
Steam B1 4-6-0 12/04/1964 61214 Transfer in from: 56D Mirfield    
Steam B1 4-6-0 12/04/1964 61309 Transfer in from: 56D Mirfield    
Steam B1 4-6-0 12/04/1964 61386 Transfer in from: 56D Mirfield    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 13/04/1964 42311 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 18/04/1964 42297 Transfer out to: 9H Patricroft    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 18/04/1964 42644 Transfer out to: 9E Trafford Park (LMS)    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 18/04/1964 44693 Transfer out to: 56D Mirfield    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 18/04/1964 44694 Transfer out to: 56D Mirfield    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 18/04/1964 44695 Transfer out to: 56D Mirfield    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 18/04/1964 44946 Transfer out to: 56D Mirfield    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 18/04/1964 44951 Transfer out to: 56D Mirfield    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 18/04/1964 45208 Transfer out to: 56D Mirfield    
Steam B1 4-6-0 07/06/1964 61014 Transfer in from: 52H Tyne Dock    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 13/06/1964 43141 Transfer in from: 50B Hull Dairycoates    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T m/e 08/1964 42411 Condemned      
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 w/e 12/09/1964 90310 Transfer out to: 56D Mirfield    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 w/e 12/09/1964 90351 Transfer out to: 56D Mirfield    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 w/e 12/09/1964 90397 Transfer out to: 56D Mirfield    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 w/e 24/10/1964 90723 Transfer out to: 52H Tyne Dock    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 28/11/1964 43141 Transfer out to: 56B Ardsley    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 05/12/1964 42664 Transfer in from: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 05/12/1964 42084 Transfer out to: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 30/01/1965 42055 Transfer in from: 56B Ardsley    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 30/01/1965 42073 Transfer in from: 56B Ardsley    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 30/01/1965 42177 Transfer in from: 56B Ardsley    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 30/01/1965 90723 Transfer in from: 52H Tyne Dock    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 4w/e 30/01/1965 43070 Transfer out to: 56B Ardsley    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 4w/e 30/01/1965 43132 Transfer out to: 56B Ardsley    
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 4w/e 27/02/1965 45565 Transfer out to: 56A Wakefield    
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 4w/e 27/02/1965 45694 Transfer out to: 56A Wakefield    
Steam B1 4-6-0 03/05/1965 61214 Condemned      
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 4w/e 19/06/1965 45565 Transfer in from: 56A Wakefield    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 19/06/1965 90731 Transfer in from: 56B Ardsley    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 26/06/1965 42074 Transfer in from: 6A Chester (Midland)    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T m/e 09/1965 42285 Condemned      
Steam B1 4-6-0 31/10/1965 61388 Transfer in from: 56B Ardsley    
Steam B1 4-6-0 31/10/1965 61016 Condemned      
Steam B1 4-6-0 31/10/1965 61023 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T m/e 06/1966 42142 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 18/06/1966 42184 Transfer in from: 55H Neville Hill    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 18/06/1966 42196 Transfer in from: 55H Neville Hill    
Steam B1 4-6-0 21/08/1966 61014 Transfer out to: 52F Blyth (North)    
Steam B1 4-6-0 21/08/1966 61386 Transfer out to: 52F Blyth (North)    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T m/e 09/1966 42074 Condemned      
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4w/e 10/09/1966 44694 Transfer in from: 56D Mirfield    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4w/e 10/09/1966 44946 Transfer in from: 56D Mirfield    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4w/e 10/09/1966 44951 Transfer in from: 56D Mirfield    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 10/09/1966 42177 Transfer out to: 56A Wakefield    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 10/09/1966 42664 Transfer out to: 56A Wakefield    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 10/09/1966 90711 Transfer out to: 56A Wakefield    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 10/09/1966 90723 Transfer out to: 56A Wakefield    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 05/11/1966 90711 Transfer in from: 56A Wakefield    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 05/11/1966 90731 Transfer out to: 56A Wakefield    
Steam B1 4-6-0 13/11/1966 61115 Transfer out to: 56A Wakefield    
Steam B1 4-6-0 13/11/1966 61189 Transfer out to: 56A Wakefield    
Steam B1 4-6-0 13/11/1966 61309 Transfer out to: 56A Wakefield    
Steam B1 4-6-0 13/11/1966 61388 Transfer out to: 56A Wakefield    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 03/12/1966 42177 Transfer in from: 56A Wakefield    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4w/e 03/12/1966 44693 Transfer in from: 56D Mirfield    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4w/e 03/12/1966 44695 Transfer in from: 56D Mirfield    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4w/e 03/12/1966 44990 Transfer in from: 56D Mirfield    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4w/e 03/12/1966 45208 Transfer in from: 56D Mirfield    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 04/12/1966 42184 Condemned      
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 14/12/1966 44951 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 17/12/1966 42177 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 31/12/1966 42233 Transfer in from: 56A Wakefield    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 31/12/1966 42235 Transfer in from: 56A Wakefield    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4w/e 31/12/1966 44946 Transfer out to: 56A Wakefield    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4w/e 31/12/1966 44990 Transfer out to: 56A Wakefield    
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 06/01/1967 45565 Condemned      
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 06/01/1967 90711 Condemned      
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 28/01/1967 90633 Transfer in from: 56A Wakefield    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 27/04/1967 42233 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 29/04/1967 42251 Transfer in from: 12E Tebay    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 29/04/1967 42283 Transfer in from: 9E Trafford Park (LMS)    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 29/04/1967 42587 Transfer in from: 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 29/04/1967 42665 Transfer in from: 12E Tebay    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 20/05/1967 42141 Transfer in from: 55D Royston    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 29/05/1967 42196 Condemned      
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 29/05/1967 44693 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 07/06/1967 42235 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 12/06/1967 42587 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 12/06/1967 42665 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 17/06/1967 42066 Transfer in from: 91E To Eastern Region    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 17/06/1967 42236 Transfer in from:        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 17/06/1967 42252 Transfer in from: 91E To Eastern Region    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 17/06/1967 42616 Transfer in from: 91E To Eastern Region    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 24/06/1967 44695 Condemned      
Steam B1 4-6-0 25/06/1967 61030 Transfer in from: 50A York (North)    
Steam B1 4-6-0 25/06/1967 61306 Transfer in from: 53A Hull Dairycoates    
Steam B1 4-6-0 25/06/1967 61337 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 27/06/1967 42055 Condemned      
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 12/07/1967 90633 Condemned      
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4w/e 15/07/1967 44662 Transfer in from: 20A Holbeck (MR)    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 15/07/1967 42073 Transfer out to: 55E Normanton    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 15/07/1967 42252 Transfer out to: 55E Normanton    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 19/08/1967 42066 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 28/08/1967 42283 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 09/09/1967 42072 Transfer in from: 55A Holbeck (MR)    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 09/09/1967 42145 Transfer in from:        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 09/09/1967 42152 Transfer in from: 55A Holbeck (MR)    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 09/09/1967 42689 Transfer in from: 55A Holbeck (MR)    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 4w/e 09/09/1967 43076 Transfer in from:        
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 4w/e 09/09/1967 43084 Transfer in from:        
Steam B1 4-6-0 30/09/1967 61030 Condemned      
Steam B1 4-6-0 30/09/1967 61306 Condemned      
Steam B1 4-6-0 30/09/1967 61337 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T m/e 10/1967 42072 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T m/e 10/1967 42141 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T m/e 10/1967 42152 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T m/e 10/1967 42251 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T m/e 10/1967 42616 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T m/e 10/1967 42689 Condemned      
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 m/e 10/1967 44662 Condemned      
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 m/e 10/1967 44694 Condemned      
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 m/e 10/1967 45208 Condemned