Depot: Banbury
Type | Class | Wheels | Period | Date | Number | Event | Code | Depot | Length of Stay | Notes |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | 6307 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 14/12/1935 | 4108 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 4w/e | 14/12/1935 | 7227 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 11/01/1936 | 3395 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/01/1936 | 5348 | Transfer in from: | STB | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | 6320 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | 7703 | Transfer in from: | SRD | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 07/03/1936 | 2833 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/03/1936 | 5397 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/03/1936 | 6316 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 4w/e | 07/03/1936 | 7238 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 4w/e | 07/03/1936 | 7239 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/03/1936 | 7310 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/03/1936 | 6320 | Transfer out to: | OXF | Oxford | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 01/12/1945 | 7703 | Transfer out to: | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 23/03/1946 | 5954 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/04/1946 | 2981 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/05/1946 | 2981 | Transfer in from: | BAN | Banbury | ||
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/05/1946 | 2981 | Transfer out to: | BAN | Banbury | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 1428 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 1458 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 1473 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 2256 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 2295 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 2408 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Aberdare | 2-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 2612 | Snapshot | PPRD | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | Aberdare | 2-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 2643 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 2805 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 2816 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 2817 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 2833 | Snapshot | BHD | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 2869 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 2871 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 2874 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 2878 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 2882 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 2885 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 2895 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 2898 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 2899 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 2981 | Snapshot | BAN | Banbury | ||
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 2981 | Snapshot | BAN | Banbury | ||
Steam | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 3395 | Snapshot | EXE | Exeter | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 3630 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 3694 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 3751 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 3802 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 3803 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 3819 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 3820 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 3821 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 3825 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 3827 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 3829 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 3861 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 4108 | Snapshot | SRD | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 4118 | Snapshot | OXF | Oxford | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 4631 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 4646 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 4909 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5302 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5317 | Snapshot | SW Stock | Swindon Stock shed | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5324 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5348 | Snapshot | HFD | Hereford | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5349 | Snapshot | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5361 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5373 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5397 | Snapshot | DID | Didcot | ||
Steam | 54xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 5404 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 54xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 5407 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 54xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 5424 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 5724 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 5736 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5930 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5954 | Snapshot | BAN | Banbury | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5954 | Snapshot | BAN | Banbury | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5967 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5991 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5992 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 6307 | Snapshot | SALOP | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 6316 | Snapshot | CNYD | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 6390 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 6696 | Snapshot | LMTN | Leamington | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 6803 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 6816 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 6832 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 6835 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 6839 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 6841 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 6849 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 6854 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 6906 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 6929 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 7227 | Snapshot | OXY | Oxley | ||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 7238 | Snapshot | OXY | Oxley | ||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 7239 | Snapshot | STJ | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 7310 | Snapshot | CNYD | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 7763 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 7800 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 7805 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 7806 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 7811 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 8729 | Snapshot | STB | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 8787 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 9782 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 24/01/1948 | 2882 | Transfer out to: | CHR | Chester West | ||
Steam | Aberdare | 2-6-0 | on | 29/01/1948 | 2612 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 21/02/1948 | 2885 | Transfer out to: | STB | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/04/1948 | 2817 | Transfer out to: | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/04/1948 | 2895 | Transfer out to: | OXY | Oxley | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | m/e | 05/1948 | 5302 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | m/e | 05/1948 | 5349 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/06/1948 | 3852 | Transfer in from: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/06/1948 | 2869 | Transfer out to: | CHR | Chester West | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/06/1948 | 2874 | Transfer out to: | STB | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/06/1948 | 2898 | Transfer out to: | CHR | Chester West | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/06/1948 | 3803 | Transfer out to: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4w/e | 10/07/1948 | 1428 | Transfer out to: | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 10/07/1948 | 2871 | Transfer out to: | CNYD | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 10/07/1948 | 2878 | Transfer out to: | SALOP | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 10/07/1948 | 3825 | Transfer out to: | CNYD | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 10/07/1948 | 3827 | Transfer out to: | STB | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 10/07/1948 | 3852 | Transfer out to: | SALOP | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | Aberdare | 2-6-0 | on | 26/07/1948 | 2643 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 04/09/1948 | 2869 | Transfer in from: | CHR | Chester West | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 04/09/1948 | 2897 | Transfer in from: | SALOP | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 04/09/1948 | 2898 | Transfer in from: | CHR | Chester West | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 04/09/1948 | 3821 | Transfer out to: | STB | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 04/09/1948 | 4856 | Transfer out to: | LLY | Llanelli | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | on | 14/10/1948 | 2883 | Transfer in from: | CHR | Chester West | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 30/10/1948 | 2886 | Transfer in from: | SALOP | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 30/10/1948 | 5745 | Transfer in from: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 27/11/1948 | 5745 | Transfer out to: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 54xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 29/01/1949 | 5417 | Transfer in from: | SHL | Southall | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4w/e | 26/03/1949 | 1401 | Transfer in from: | CNYD | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4w/e | 26/03/1949 | 1411 | Transfer in from: | CNYD | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/04/1949 | 4909 | Transfer out to: | OXY | Oxley | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/04/1949 | 5991 | Transfer out to: | OXY | Oxley | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 21/05/1949 | 2863 | Transfer in from: | LLY | Llanelli | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 21/05/1949 | 3865 | Transfer in from: | STJ | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 18/06/1949 | 2853 | Transfer in from: | CHR | Chester West | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 18/06/1949 | 3813 | Transfer in from: | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 18/06/1949 | 3831 | Transfer in from: | STJ | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/06/1949 | 2408 | Transfer out to: | OXY | Oxley | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 30/06/1949 | 2853 | Transfer in from: | BAN | Banbury | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 30/06/1949 | 3813 | Transfer in from: | BAN | Banbury | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 30/06/1949 | 3831 | Transfer in from: | BAN | Banbury | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 30/06/1949 | 2853 | Transfer out to: | BAN | Banbury | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 30/06/1949 | 3813 | Transfer out to: | BAN | Banbury | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 30/06/1949 | 3831 | Transfer out to: | BAN | Banbury | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 16/07/1949 | 2847 | Transfer in from: | PPRD | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 16/07/1949 | 3820 | Transfer in from: | LLY | Llanelli | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 13/08/1949 | 2848 | Transfer in from: | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 13/08/1949 | 3837 | Transfer in from: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 13/08/1949 | 5992 | Transfer out to: | SPM | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 13/08/1949 | 7800 | Transfer out to: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 10/09/1949 | 3837 | Transfer out to: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/11/1949 | 2408 | Transfer in from: | OXY | Oxley | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 03/12/1949 | 3863 | Transfer in from: | WES | Westbury | ||
Steam | Achilles | 4-2-2 | 4w/e | 31/12/1949 | 3020 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1949 | 3849 | Transfer in from: | WES | Westbury | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1949 | 2848 | Transfer out to: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1949 | 6832 | Transfer out to: | SPM | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1949 | 6849 | Transfer out to: | SPM | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Achilles | 4-2-2 | 4w/e | 28/01/1950 | 3043 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/01/1950 | 5954 | Transfer out to: | LMTN | Leamington | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 25/02/1950 | 4149 | Transfer in from: | STB | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 25/02/1950 | 6418 | Transfer in from: | SRD | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 25/02/1950 | 8405 | Transfer in from: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 25/02/1950 | 8407 | Transfer in from: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 25/02/1950 | 3751 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 25/02/1950 | 5736 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4w/e | 25/03/1950 | 1473 | Transfer out to: | 84J | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 20/05/1950 | 8400 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/05/1950 | 2408 | Transfer out to: | 89A | Oswestry | ||
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 20/05/1950 | 6418 | Transfer out to: | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 3w/e | 31/05/1950 | 6949 | Transfer in from: | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | m/e | 06/1950 | 5373 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 17/06/1950 | 6418 | Transfer in from: | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 15/07/1950 | 5332 | Transfer in from: | OXY | Oxley | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 15/07/1950 | 6819 | Transfer in from: | BHD | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 15/07/1950 | 6841 | Transfer out to: | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 12/08/1950 | 3813 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 5391 | Transfer in from: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 6354 | Transfer in from: | PZ | Penzance | ||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 7805 | Transfer out to: | 83E | St Blazey | ||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 7806 | Transfer out to: | 83G | Penzance | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 30/09/1950 | 9426 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/09/1950 | 5391 | Transfer in from: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/09/1950 | 6354 | Transfer in from: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/09/1950 | 5391 | Transfer out to: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/09/1950 | 6354 | Transfer out to: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4w/e | 21/10/1950 | 1411 | Transfer out to: | 34E | Neasden | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 4918 | Transfer in from: | CHR | Chester West | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 4960 | Transfer in from: | SRD | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 4980 | Transfer in from: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 6901 | Transfer in from: | SRD | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 7800 | Transfer in from: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 1458 | Transfer out to: | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 2869 | Transfer out to: | 84K | Chester West | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 6354 | Transfer out to: | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 4918 | Transfer in from: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 4960 | Transfer in from: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 4980 | Transfer in from: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 6901 | Transfer in from: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 7800 | Transfer in from: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | w/e | 31/12/1950 | 3829 | Transfer out to: | 84K | Chester West | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 4918 | Transfer out to: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 4960 | Transfer out to: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 4980 | Transfer out to: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 6901 | Transfer out to: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 7800 | Transfer out to: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/01/1951 | 5994 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 9438 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | m/e | 03/1951 | 2981 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 31/03/1951 | 9438 | Transfer in from: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 31/03/1951 | 9438 | Transfer out to: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 2805 | Transfer out to: | 86B | Newport Pill | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 2863 | Transfer out to: | 86B | Newport Pill | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 2883 | Transfer out to: | 86B | Newport Pill | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 3849 | Transfer out to: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 3865 | Transfer out to: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | 54xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 5417 | Transfer out to: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 5930 | Transfer out to: | MC | Melton Constable | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 6835 | Transfer out to: | 84D | Leamington | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 70801 | Transfer in from: | MC | Melton Constable | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 90579 | Transfer in from: | MC | Melton Constable | ||
Steam | Achilles | 4-2-2 | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 3026 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 3100/5100 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 5137 | Transfer in from: | CHR | Chester West | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 6835 | Transfer in from: | 84D | Leamington | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 8452 | Transfer in from: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 9425 | Transfer in from: | 84K | Chester West | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 4646 | Transfer out to: | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 30/06/1951 | 9449 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 3100/5100 | 2-6-2T | 6w/e | 30/06/1951 | 5137 | Transfer in from: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6w/e | 30/06/1951 | 6835 | Transfer in from: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 6w/e | 30/06/1951 | 8452 | Transfer in from: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 6w/e | 30/06/1951 | 9425 | Transfer in from: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | 3100/5100 | 2-6-2T | 6w/e | 30/06/1951 | 5137 | Transfer out to: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6w/e | 30/06/1951 | 6835 | Transfer out to: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 6w/e | 30/06/1951 | 8452 | Transfer out to: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 6w/e | 30/06/1951 | 9425 | Transfer out to: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/07/1951 | 5369 | Transfer in from: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/07/1951 | 6332 | Transfer in from: | STB | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 14/07/1951 | 6418 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/07/1951 | 6803 | Transfer out to: | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/07/1951 | 7800 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 14/07/1951 | 9782 | Transfer out to: | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | m/e | 31/07/1951 | 5369 | Transfer in from: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | m/e | 31/07/1951 | 6332 | Transfer in from: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | m/e | 31/07/1951 | 5369 | Transfer out to: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | m/e | 31/07/1951 | 6332 | Transfer out to: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | 3100/5100 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 5141 | Transfer in from: | CHR | Chester West | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 8729 | Transfer out to: | 84K | Chester West | ||
Steam | 3100/5100 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 31/08/1951 | 5141 | Transfer in from: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | 3100/5100 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 31/08/1951 | 5141 | Transfer out to: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | 3100/5100 | 2-6-2T | m/e | 10/1951 | 5137 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | m/e | 31/10/1951 | 2857 | Transfer in from: | STB | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 31/10/1951 | 4900 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | m/e | 31/10/1951 | 7800 | Transfer in from: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | m/e | 31/10/1951 | 7823 | Transfer in from: | 84K | Chester West | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 31/10/1951 | 2295 | Transfer out to: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 8w/e | 03/11/1951 | 5369 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/12/1951 | 6963 | Transfer in from: | SALOP | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/12/1951 | 6966 | Transfer in from: | 84A | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/12/1951 | 6976 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 01/12/1951 | 90192 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 4102 | Transfer in from: | LMTN | Leamington | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 5954 | Transfer in from: | LMTN | Leamington | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 6833 | Transfer in from: | LMTN | Leamington | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 1401 | Transfer out to: | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 3630 | Transfer out to: | 84K | Chester West | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 5994 | Transfer out to: | 84K | Chester West | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 6901 | Transfer out to: | 84K | Chester West | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1951 | 6963 | Transfer in from: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1951 | 6966 | Transfer in from: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1951 | 6976 | Transfer in from: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1951 | 90192 | Transfer in from: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1951 | 90313 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1951 | 6963 | Transfer out to: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1951 | 6966 | Transfer out to: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1951 | 6976 | Transfer out to: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1951 | 90192 | Transfer out to: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 31/01/1952 | 4102 | Transfer in from: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/01/1952 | 5954 | Transfer in from: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/01/1952 | 6833 | Transfer in from: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 31/01/1952 | 90485 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 31/01/1952 | 4102 | Transfer out to: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/01/1952 | 5954 | Transfer out to: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/01/1952 | 6833 | Transfer out to: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 09/02/1952 | 90313 | Transfer in from: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 09/02/1952 | 90313 | Transfer out to: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 4977 | Transfer in from: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 29/02/1952 | 90313 | Transfer in from: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 29/02/1952 | 90313 | Transfer out to: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 6625 | Transfer in from: | LMTN | Leamington | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 4102 | Transfer out to: | 84D | Leamington | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/03/1952 | 4977 | Transfer in from: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/03/1952 | 4977 | Transfer out to: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 4102 | Transfer in from: | 84D | Leamington | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 6856 | Transfer in from: | SRD | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 6879 | Transfer in from: | OXY | Oxley | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 2899 | Transfer out to: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 3802 | Transfer out to: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 3863 | Transfer out to: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 6332 | Transfer out to: | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 6963 | Transfer out to: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 30/04/1952 | 6625 | Transfer in from: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 30/04/1952 | 4102 | Transfer out to: | 84D | Leamington | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 30/04/1952 | 6625 | Transfer out to: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 4102 | Transfer in from: | 84D | Leamington | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 6856 | Transfer in from: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 6879 | Transfer in from: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 2853 | Transfer out to: | 84J | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 6856 | Transfer out to: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 6879 | Transfer out to: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 07/06/1952 | 4095 | Transfer in from: | LDR | Landore | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 5307 | Transfer in from: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 90572 | Transfer in from: | CHR | Chester West | ||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 7800 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 17/06/1952 | 4095 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6w/e | 30/06/1952 | 5307 | Transfer in from: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 6w/e | 30/06/1952 | 90572 | Transfer in from: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6w/e | 30/06/1952 | 5307 | Transfer out to: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 6w/e | 30/06/1952 | 90572 | Transfer out to: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2w/e | 12/07/1952 | 2835 | Transfer in from: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 2w/e | 12/07/1952 | 6833 | Transfer out to: | 84K | Chester West | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 2w/e | 12/07/1952 | 6835 | Transfer out to: | 84K | Chester West | ||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 2w/e | 12/07/1952 | 7811 | Transfer out to: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 2w/e | 12/07/1952 | 90192 | Transfer out to: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 2w/e | 12/07/1952 | 90572 | Transfer out to: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 2827 | Transfer in from: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 3839 | Transfer in from: | WOS | Worcester | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 4900 | Transfer out to: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 4918 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 4960 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 5967 | Transfer out to: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 6929 | Transfer out to: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 7w/e | 31/08/1952 | 2827 | Transfer in from: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 7w/e | 31/08/1952 | 3839 | Transfer in from: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 7w/e | 31/08/1952 | 2827 | Transfer out to: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 7w/e | 31/08/1952 | 3839 | Transfer out to: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | WD/10 | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 90757 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | 3100/5100 | 2-6-2T | m/e | 10/1952 | 5141 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 2812 | Transfer in from: | SPM | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 2823 | Transfer in from: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 3859 | Transfer in from: | CHR | Chester West | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 5950 | Transfer in from: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 5391 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 6854 | Transfer out to: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 6856 | Transfer out to: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 6879 | Transfer out to: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Steam | WD/10 | 2-10-0 | 8w/e | 07/10/1952 | 90757 | Transfer out to: | 74A | Ashford | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 2817 | Transfer in from: | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 2819 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 2834 | Transfer in from: | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 4987 | Transfer in from: | 84D | Leamington | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 6860 | Transfer in from: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 7315 | Transfer in from: | SRD | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 3820 | Transfer out to: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 3839 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 5307 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 5324 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 6390 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 6625 | Transfer out to: | 84J | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 6696 | Transfer out to: | 84J | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 90312 | Transfer out to: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 90485 | Transfer out to: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | Achilles | 4-2-2 | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 3024 | Transfer in from: | DID | Didcot | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 5967 | Transfer in from: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 6929 | Transfer in from: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 5399 | Transfer in from: | 84J | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 2898 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 3861 | Transfer out to: | 85C | Hereford | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 6816 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 5947 | Transfer in from: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 2819 | Transfer out to: | 81E | Didcot | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 2246 | Transfer in from: | STB | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 2247 | Transfer in from: | WOS | Worcester | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 5170 | Transfer in from: | STB | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 2202 | Transfer in from: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 6860 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/08/1953 | 6819 | Transfer out to: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 2209 | Transfer in from: | 84J | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 2259 | Transfer in from: | 84J | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 2297 | Transfer in from: | CNYD | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 3694 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 5724 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 6949 | Transfer out to: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 25/11/1953 | 3694 | Transfer in from: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 25/11/1953 | 5724 | Transfer in from: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 26/12/1953 | 2850 | Transfer in from: | 82D | Westbury | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 30/01/1954 | 3694 | Transfer out to: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 27/03/1954 | 3694 | Transfer in from: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 2858 | Transfer in from: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 6839 | Transfer out to: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 90313 | Transfer out to: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 5945 | Transfer in from: | OXY | Oxley | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 2822 | Transfer in from: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 2867 | Transfer in from: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 3829 | Transfer in from: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 3835 | Transfer in from: | OXF | Oxford | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 4118 | Transfer out to: | 84D | Leamington | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 5945 | Transfer out to: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 9438 | Transfer out to: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 2858 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 5967 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 23/02/1955 | 13105 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 04/03/1955 | 13106 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 11/03/1955 | 13107 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 11/03/1955 | 13108 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 16/03/1955 | 13109 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 22/03/1955 | 13110 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/04/1955 | 6362 | Transfer in from: | 84J | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 23/04/1955 | 90716 | Transfer in from: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 23/04/1955 | 2834 | Transfer out to: | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 21/05/1955 | 90585 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/05/1955 | 4102 | Transfer out to: | 84K | Chester West | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/05/1955 | 5950 | Transfer out to: | 82D | Westbury | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 21/05/1955 | 8407 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 21/05/1955 | 9426 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 16/07/1955 | 3836 | Transfer in from: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 16/07/1955 | 48402 | Transfer in from: | 19C | Canklow | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 16/07/1955 | 48412 | Transfer in from: | 18A | Toton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 16/07/1955 | 48419 | Transfer in from: | 18A | Toton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 16/07/1955 | 48471 | Transfer in from: | 15B | Kettering | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 16/07/1955 | 90466 | Transfer in from: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/07/1955 | 2202 | Transfer out to: | 84J | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/07/1955 | 2209 | Transfer out to: | 84J | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/07/1955 | 2256 | Transfer out to: | 84J | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 16/07/1955 | 2817 | Transfer out to: | 84K | Chester West | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 16/07/1955 | 2857 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 13/08/1955 | 9774 | Transfer in from: | 84H | Wellington | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 13/08/1955 | 3694 | Transfer out to: | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 13/08/1955 | 3836 | Transfer out to: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 13/08/1955 | 4631 | Transfer out to: | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 13/08/1955 | 48402 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 13/08/1955 | 8400 | Transfer out to: | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 13/08/1955 | 8405 | Transfer out to: | 87B | Duffryn Yard | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 13/08/1955 | 8787 | Transfer out to: | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 13/08/1955 | 90579 | Transfer out to: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/09/1955 | 13108 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 10/09/1955 | 5724 | Transfer out to: | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 13108 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 2202 | Transfer in from: | 84J | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 2209 | Transfer in from: | 84J | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 2256 | Transfer in from: | 84J | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 4942 | Transfer in from: | 83C | Exeter | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 5152 | Transfer in from: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 5399 | Transfer out to: | 84K | Chester West | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 9425 | Transfer out to: | 88F | Treherbert | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 9774 | Transfer out to: | 84H | Wellington | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 05/11/1955 | 3646 | Transfer in from: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/11/1955 | 5306 | Transfer in from: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/11/1955 | 6387 | Transfer in from: | SDN | Swindon | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 05/11/1955 | 7763 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 6331 | Transfer in from: | 84K | Chester West | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 4987 | Transfer out to: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1955 | 4980 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1955 | 7823 | Transfer out to: | 83E | St Blazey | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 2202 | Transfer out to: | 89C | Machynlleth | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 5317 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 2209 | Transfer out to: | 84J | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 2850 | Transfer out to: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 4977 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 5954 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Laira | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 13105 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1956 | 5379 | Transfer in from: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1956 | 6355 | Transfer in from: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1956 | 6966 | Transfer out to: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 13105 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 9303 | Transfer in from: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 9312 | Transfer in from: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1956 | 2827 | Transfer out to: | 82D | Westbury | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1956 | 6355 | Transfer out to: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 2897 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 29/12/1956 | 2835 | Transfer out to: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 29/12/1956 | 2867 | Transfer out to: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 29/12/1956 | 3835 | Transfer out to: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 8w/e | 20/04/1957 | 6362 | Transfer out to: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8w/e | 20/04/1957 | 8452 | Transfer out to: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 13/07/1957 | 6392 | Transfer in from: | CHR | Chester West | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 13/07/1957 | 7308 | Transfer in from: | HFD | Hereford | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 13/07/1957 | 8452 | Transfer in from: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 13/07/1957 | 2247 | Transfer out to: | 84J | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 07/09/1957 | 2822 | Transfer out to: | 83B | Taunton | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/10/1957 | 6823 | Transfer in from: | 84K | Chester West | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/11/1957 | 4924 | Transfer in from: | 83F | Truro | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/11/1957 | 4964 | Transfer in from: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/11/1957 | 5989 | Transfer in from: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 02/11/1957 | 3829 | Transfer out to: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/11/1957 | 6392 | Transfer out to: | 89C | Machynlleth | ||
Steam | 54xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 12/1957 | 5404 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 54xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 5420 | Transfer in from: | SHL | Southall | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 5921 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 6635 | Transfer in from: | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 2246 | Transfer out to: | 81E | Didcot | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 2816 | Transfer out to: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 2847 | Transfer out to: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | 58xx | 0-4-2T | 4w/e | 22/02/1958 | 5815 | Transfer in from: | 84D | Leamington | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 22/02/1958 | 3859 | Transfer out to: | 86G | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 22/02/1958 | 48419 | Transfer out to: | 87K | Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 6848 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 90148 | Transfer in from: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 6635 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Radyr | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 19/04/1958 | 90313 | Transfer in from: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 19/04/1958 | 2886 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 19/04/1958 | 3831 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 58xx | 0-4-2T | 4w/e | 19/04/1958 | 5815 | Transfer out to: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | m/e | 05/1958 | 5379 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/05/1958 | 7305 | Transfer in from: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/06/1958 | 6848 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 2882 | Transfer in from: | 84K | Chester West | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 3820 | Transfer in from: | 84K | Chester West | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 3858 | Transfer in from: | CHR | Chester West | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 92221 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 48412 | Transfer out to: | 6E | Chester West | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 48471 | Transfer out to: | 6E | Chester West | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 6823 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | on | 30/06/1958 | 92222 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | on | 30/06/1958 | 92223 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | on | 30/06/1958 | 92224 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | on | 30/06/1958 | 92225 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | on | 30/06/1958 | 92226 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | on | 31/07/1958 | 92227 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | on | 31/07/1958 | 92228 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 09/08/1958 | 92229 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | on | 31/08/1958 | 92230 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 2812 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 2823 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 2882 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 3819 | Transfer out to: | 82D | Westbury | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 2211 | Transfer in from: | 84J | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 2230 | Transfer in from: | 84J | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 2234 | Transfer in from: | SALOP | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 2816 | Transfer in from: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 2853 | Transfer in from: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 6949 | Transfer in from: | 84A | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 5306 | Transfer out to: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1958 | 2890 | Transfer in from: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1958 | 3856 | Transfer in from: | SHL | Southall | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1958 | 5332 | Transfer out to: | 87F | Llanelli | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1958 | 5361 | Transfer out to: | 83F | Truro | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1958 | 92229 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1958 | 92230 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/11/1958 | 6311 | Transfer in from: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/12/1958 | 2259 | Transfer out to: | 87H | Neyland | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | on | 31/12/1958 | 92250 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/01/1959 | 5337 | Transfer in from: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 24/01/1959 | 2853 | Transfer out to: | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/02/1959 | 5375 | Transfer in from: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 21/02/1959 | 90466 | Transfer out to: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 21/03/1959 | 3820 | Transfer out to: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Steam | 54xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 04/1959 | 5424 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | m/e | 04/1959 | 6331 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/05/1959 | 5351 | Transfer in from: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 13/06/1959 | 6429 | Transfer in from: | 84J | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 13/06/1959 | 2211 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 11/07/1959 | 3816 | Transfer in from: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 11/07/1959 | 3863 | Transfer in from: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 4w/e | 11/07/1959 | 7217 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 4w/e | 11/07/1959 | 7237 | Transfer in from: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 11/07/1959 | 90268 | Transfer in from: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/07/1959 | 4924 | Transfer out to: | 83B | Taunton | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 11/07/1959 | 92221 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 11/07/1959 | 92222 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 11/07/1959 | 92223 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 11/07/1959 | 92224 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 11/07/1959 | 92225 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 18/07/1959 | 90716 | Transfer out to: | 18B | Westhouses | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/08/1959 | 2230 | Transfer out to: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 05/09/1959 | 2841 | Transfer in from: | 84A | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/09/1959 | 4990 | Transfer in from: | 84A | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 05/09/1959 | 90261 | Transfer in from: | 84D | Leamington | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 05/09/1959 | 90483 | Transfer in from: | 84D | Leamington | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/09/1959 | D3108 | Transfer out to: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/09/1959 | 5337 | Transfer out to: | 81E | Didcot | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/09/1959 | 5351 | Transfer out to: | 81E | Didcot | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/09/1959 | 5375 | Transfer out to: | 81E | Didcot | ||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 4w/e | 05/09/1959 | 7237 | Transfer out to: | 86J | Aberdare | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | on | 30/09/1959 | 92212 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | m/e | 10/1959 | 2816 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/10/1959 | D3108 | Transfer in from: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 03/10/1959 | 92232 | Transfer in from: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 03/10/1959 | 92233 | Transfer in from: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 03/10/1959 | 92234 | Transfer in from: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/10/1959 | 2234 | Transfer out to: | 81E | Didcot | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 03/10/1959 | 2841 | Transfer out to: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 03/10/1959 | 3858 | Transfer out to: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 03/10/1959 | 3863 | Transfer out to: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 4w/e | 03/10/1959 | 7217 | Transfer out to: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 21/10/1959 | 7011 | Transfer in from: | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/10/1959 | 6364 | Transfer in from: | TN | Taunton | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/10/1959 | 4990 | Transfer out to: | 85C | Hereford | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 04/11/1959 | 4078 | Transfer in from: | 84A | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 04/11/1959 | 5057 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/11/1959 | 6911 | Transfer in from: | 83G | Penzance | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/11/1959 | 7905 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 28/11/1959 | 8498 | Transfer in from: | 86F | Tondu | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 28/11/1959 | 92213 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 28/11/1959 | 92214 | Transfer in from: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 28/11/1959 | 2890 | Transfer out to: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/11/1959 | 5947 | Transfer out to: | 87J | Fishguard Goodwick | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 28/11/1959 | 92250 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | on | 30/11/1959 | 92215 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | m/e | 12/1959 | 5170 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 26/12/1959 | 3856 | Transfer out to: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | m/e | 01/1960 | 6311 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 30/01/1960 | 6403 | Transfer in from: | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 4w/e | 30/01/1960 | 7247 | Transfer in from: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/01/1960 | 6364 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/01/1960 | 6949 | Transfer out to: | 83B | Taunton | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/01/1960 | 7308 | Transfer out to: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | 54xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 27/02/1960 | 5417 | Transfer in from: | 14D | Neasden | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/02/1960 | 6335 | Transfer in from: | 89C | Machynlleth | ||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 4w/e | 27/02/1960 | 7228 | Transfer in from: | LLY | Llanelli | ||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 4w/e | 27/02/1960 | 7244 | Transfer in from: | 87B | Duffryn Yard | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 24/03/1960 | 5057 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/03/1960 | 3217 | Transfer in from: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/03/1960 | 4910 | Transfer in from: | CARM | Carmarthen | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/03/1960 | 4923 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/03/1960 | 5988 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/03/1960 | 5990 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 26/03/1960 | 92221 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 26/03/1960 | 92222 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 26/03/1960 | 92223 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 04/04/1960 | 4078 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 04/04/1960 | 7011 | Transfer out to: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 23/04/1960 | 4154 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 23/04/1960 | 5167 | Transfer in from: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/04/1960 | 5947 | Transfer in from: | 87J | Fishguard Goodwick | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 23/04/1960 | 3816 | Transfer out to: | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/05/1960 | 5933 | Transfer in from: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/05/1960 | 6952 | Transfer in from: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 21/05/1960 | 8452 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 21/05/1960 | 8498 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 06/1960 | 2297 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 54xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 06/1960 | 5407 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 06/1960 | 9449 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 3817 | Transfer in from: | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 3843 | Transfer in from: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 3846 | Transfer in from: | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 7207 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 7236 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 90315 | Transfer in from: | 85E | Gloucester Barnwood | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 4923 | Transfer out to: | 87G | Carmarthen | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 4942 | Transfer out to: | 83C | Exeter | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 5921 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 7334 | Transfer out to: | 87G | Carmarthen | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 92221 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 92222 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 92223 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 16/07/1960 | 6421 | Transfer in from: | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/07/1960 | 4910 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 16/07/1960 | 92226 | Transfer out to: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 13/08/1960 | 6335 | Transfer out to: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 4910 | Transfer in from: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 7929 | Transfer in from: | 83E | St Blazey | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 92221 | Transfer in from: | 82D | Westbury | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 3846 | Transfer out to: | 89B | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 05/11/1960 | 90188 | Transfer in from: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 05/11/1960 | 90323 | Transfer in from: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 05/11/1960 | 90691 | Transfer in from: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 05/11/1960 | 92221 | Transfer out to: | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 4w/e | 03/12/1960 | 7208 | Transfer in from: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 4w/e | 03/12/1960 | 7217 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/12/1960 | 4910 | Transfer out to: | 81E | Didcot | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/12/1960 | 5933 | Transfer out to: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/12/1960 | 5989 | Transfer out to: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/12/1960 | 7305 | Transfer out to: | 83B | Taunton | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 03/12/1960 | 90323 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1960 | 3843 | Transfer out to: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1960 | 6387 | Transfer out to: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1960 | 7315 | Transfer out to: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1960 | 90188 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | 54xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 01/1961 | 5417 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 28/01/1961 | 2889 | Transfer in from: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 28/01/1961 | 3809 | Transfer in from: | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 28/01/1961 | 3855 | Transfer in from: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/01/1961 | 6317 | Transfer in from: | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/01/1961 | 6367 | Transfer in from: | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 28/01/1961 | 90693 | Transfer in from: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 28/01/1961 | 92227 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 28/01/1961 | 92233 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 4w/e | 25/02/1961 | 7217 | Transfer out to: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 25/03/1961 | 3646 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 22/04/1961 | 90565 | Transfer in from: | 81E | Didcot | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 17/06/1961 | 92212 | Transfer out to: | 82F | Bath Green Park (S&D) | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 15/07/1961 | 2256 | Transfer out to: | 86C | Hereford | ||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 4w/e | 12/08/1961 | 7247 | Transfer out to: | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4w/e | 09/09/1961 | 1445 | Transfer in from: | HFD | Hereford | ||
Steam | 54xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 09/09/1961 | 5420 | Transfer in from: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | 54xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 09/09/1961 | 5420 | Transfer out to: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 4w/e | 09/09/1961 | 7208 | Transfer out to: | 88J | Aberdare | ||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 4w/e | 09/09/1961 | 7244 | Transfer out to: | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 1455 | Transfer in from: | HFD | Hereford | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 5912 | Transfer in from: | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 6904 | Transfer in from: | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 92000 | Transfer in from: | 82F | Bath Green Park (S&D) | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 1445 | Transfer out to: | 81B | Slough | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 5152 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 6421 | Transfer out to: | 84H | Wellington | ||
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 6429 | Transfer out to: | 84H | Wellington | ||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 7228 | Transfer out to: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 90565 | Transfer out to: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 90693 | Transfer out to: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 92234 | Transfer out to: | 85D | Bromsgrove | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | 90485 | Transfer in from: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | 7325 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4w/e | 02/12/1961 | 1440 | Transfer in from: | 89D | Oswestry | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4w/e | 02/12/1961 | 1453 | Transfer in from: | 81B | Slough | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 02/12/1961 | 2888 | Transfer in from: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 02/12/1961 | 92234 | Transfer in from: | 85D | Bromsgrove | ||
Steam | 54xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 02/12/1961 | 5420 | Transfer out to: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 02/12/1961 | 92214 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 30/12/1961 | 3821 | Transfer in from: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 30/12/1961 | 90148 | Transfer out to: | 85C | Gloucester Barnwood | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 30/12/1961 | 90268 | Transfer out to: | 85C | Gloucester Barnwood | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | m/e | 01/1962 | 5167 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 24/02/1962 | 90261 | Transfer out to: | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 24/03/1962 | 4112 | Transfer in from: | LMTN | Leamington | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/03/1962 | 46526 | Transfer in from: | 89A | Oswestry | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/03/1962 | 46527 | Transfer in from: | 89A | Oswestry | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 24/03/1962 | 92000 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/04/1962 | 5926 | Transfer in from: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/04/1962 | 7912 | Transfer in from: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4w/e | 21/04/1962 | 1440 | Transfer out to: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4w/e | 19/05/1962 | 1440 | Transfer in from: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 19/05/1962 | 2889 | Transfer out to: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 31/05/1962 | 90691 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/06/1962 | 3217 | Transfer out to: | 84D | Leamington | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 07/1962 | 5947 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 2845 | Transfer in from: | 86G | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 2851 | Transfer in from: | 83B | Taunton | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 3806 | Transfer in from: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 4964 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 7929 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 15/07/1962 | 90585 | Transfer out to: | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | m/e | 08/1962 | 4112 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 11/08/1962 | 2855 | Transfer in from: | 84J | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 11/08/1962 | 2866 | Transfer in from: | 86G | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 11/08/1962 | 3849 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 11/08/1962 | 92227 | Transfer in from: | 88A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 11/08/1962 | 92247 | Transfer in from: | 88A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4w/e | 11/08/1962 | 1453 | Transfer out to: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/08/1962 | 5988 | Transfer out to: | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 11/08/1962 | 92234 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 30/08/1962 | 90315 | Transfer out to: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 09/1962 | 5926 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 6129 | Transfer in from: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 92232 | Transfer out to: | 88L | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 2289 | Transfer in from: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 4105 | Transfer in from: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 46526 | Transfer out to: | 89D | Oswestry | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 46527 | Transfer out to: | 89D | Oswestry | ||
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 6403 | Transfer out to: | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 6952 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 3825 | Transfer in from: | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 3845 | Transfer in from: | 88J | Aberdare | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2w/e | 17/11/1962 | 2875 | Transfer in from: | 82D | Westbury | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 2w/e | 17/11/1962 | 6952 | Transfer in from: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 2w/e | 17/11/1962 | 7218 | Transfer in from: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 02/12/1962 | 90313 | Transfer out to: | 41F | Mexborough | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 02/12/1962 | 90483 | Transfer out to: | 41J | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 02/12/1962 | 90485 | Transfer out to: | 41F | Mexborough | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | on | 12/12/1962 | 2855 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 15/12/1962 | 3828 | Transfer in from: | 84J | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 15/12/1962 | 4998 | Transfer in from: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | on | 18/12/1962 | 5912 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | w/e | 23/02/1963 | 2888 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | w/e | 02/03/1963 | 4149 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | on | 28/03/1963 | 2866 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | w/e | 30/03/1963 | 4101 | Transfer in from: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | w/e | 30/03/1963 | 6951 | Transfer in from: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 30/03/1963 | 92004 | Transfer in from: | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 30/03/1963 | 92203 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 30/03/1963 | 92204 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 30/03/1963 | 92217 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 30/03/1963 | 92218 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4w/e | 06/04/1963 | 1440 | Transfer out to: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 06/04/1963 | 2851 | Transfer out to: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 06/04/1963 | 2875 | Transfer out to: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4w/e | 04/05/1963 | 1455 | Transfer out to: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | on | 27/05/1963 | 2845 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | on | 15/06/1963 | 6317 | Transfer out to: | 84G | Kidderminster | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 2289 | Transfer out to: | 89C | Machynlleth | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/06/1963 | 2289 | Transfer in from: | 89C | Machynlleth | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 24/08/1963 | D3112 | Transfer in from: | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 92204 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 92215 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 92217 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 10/1963 | 4998 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 10/1963 | 6929 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | m/e | 11/1963 | 7236 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 6367 | Transfer out to: | 81E | Didcot | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 30/11/1963 | 92107 | Transfer in from: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | m/e | 12/1963 | 3806 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | on | 01/12/1963 | 3850 | Transfer in from: | 86J | Aberdare | ||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | on | 01/12/1963 | 7221 | Transfer in from: | 88C | Barry | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | m/e | 02/1964 | 4105 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | w/e | 11/04/1964 | 3809 | Transfer out to: | 6C | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | w/e | 11/04/1964 | 3849 | Transfer out to: | 6C | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 05/1964 | 2289 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 05/1964 | 7905 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | on | 17/05/1964 | 2221 | Transfer in from: | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | m/e | 06/1964 | 3845 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | m/e | 06/1964 | 4101 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 6907 | Transfer in from: | 6D | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 6916 | Transfer in from: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | w/e | 18/07/1964 | 6903 | Transfer in from: | 6D | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | w/e | 18/07/1964 | 6915 | Transfer in from: | 89A | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 18/07/1964 | 92002 | Transfer in from: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 18/07/1964 | 92118 | Transfer in from: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 18/07/1964 | 92128 | Transfer in from: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 18/07/1964 | 92129 | Transfer in from: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | w/e | 25/07/1964 | 3821 | Transfer out to: | 6E | Oswestry | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | w/e | 25/07/1964 | 3825 | Transfer out to: | 6E | Oswestry | ||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | m/e | 09/1964 | 7218 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 19/09/1964 | 92234 | Transfer in from: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 19/09/1964 | 92107 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | m/e | 10/1964 | 3828 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | w/e | 10/10/1964 | 3850 | Transfer out to: | 6E | Oswestry | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | w/e | 10/10/1964 | 3855 | Transfer out to: | 6E | Oswestry | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | w/e | 24/10/1964 | 6934 | Transfer in from: | 89A | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | w/e | 31/10/1964 | 6980 | Transfer in from: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 11/1964 | 2221 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | m/e | 11/1964 | 7207 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | m/e | 11/1964 | 7221 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | on | 01/11/1964 | 92224 | Transfer in from: | 88A | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 07/11/1964 | 92002 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 07/11/1964 | 92118 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 14/11/1964 | 2210 | Transfer in from: | 84D | Leamington | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 01/1965 | 5990 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 01/1965 | 6904 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | w/e | 16/01/1965 | 6917 | Transfer in from: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | w/e | 16/01/1965 | 6129 | Transfer out to: | 2C | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 30/01/1965 | D3106 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Oxley | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 02/1965 | 6907 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 02/1965 | 6915 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 06/03/1965 | 92028 | Transfer in from: | 2E | Saltley | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 04/1965 | 6906 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 04/1965 | 6911 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 01/05/1965 | D3106 | Transfer in from: | 2E | Saltley | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 01/05/1965 | D3107 | Transfer out to: | 2J | Aston | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | w/e | 08/05/1965 | 6964 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | w/e | 15/05/1965 | 6926 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | w/e | 15/05/1965 | 6930 | Transfer in from: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | w/e | 15/05/1965 | 4154 | Transfer out to: | 2C | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 06/1965 | 2210 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 12/06/1965 | 92013 | Transfer in from: | 16D | Annesley | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 12/06/1965 | 92030 | Transfer in from: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 12/06/1965 | 92073 | Transfer in from: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 6671 | Transfer in from: | 84D | Leamington | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 6697 | Transfer in from: | 2L | Leamington | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 73013 | Transfer in from: | 2B | Oxley | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 73014 | Transfer in from: | 2B | Oxley | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 73048 | Transfer in from: | 5E | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 92033 | Transfer in from: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 92067 | Transfer in from: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 92074 | Transfer in from: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 92087 | Transfer in from: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 92132 | Transfer in from: | 16B | Annesley | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 17/07/1965 | 92028 | Transfer out to: | 2E | Saltley | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 17/07/1965 | 92033 | Transfer out to: | 1H | Northampton | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 17/07/1965 | 92087 | Transfer out to: | 1H | Northampton | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | m/e | 08/1965 | 3817 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 08/1965 | 6916 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 21/08/1965 | 92132 | Transfer out to: | 1H | Northampton | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 09/1965 | 6903 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 09/1965 | 6917 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 09/1965 | 6964 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | m/e | 10/1965 | 6671 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 10/1965 | 6930 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 10/1965 | 6934 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 10/1965 | 6976 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 10/1965 | 6980 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 10/1965 | 7912 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 44710 | Transfer in from: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 44860 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 44869 | Transfer in from: | 2E | Northampton | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 44936 | Transfer in from: | 2E | Northampton | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 44942 | Transfer in from: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 45089 | Transfer in from: | 2F | Bescot | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 45114 | Transfer in from: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 45288 | Transfer in from: | 2F | Bescot | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 45299 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 45308 | Transfer in from: | 21C | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 45331 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 45392 | Transfer in from: | 1H | Northampton | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 45418 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 45426 | Transfer in from: | 1H | Northampton | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 45454 | Transfer in from: | 1H | Northampton | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 45493 | Transfer in from: | 2F | Bescot | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 70045 | Transfer in from: | 2B | Oxley | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 70046 | Transfer in from: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 70047 | Transfer in from: | 2B | Oxley | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 70050 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 70051 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 70052 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 70053 | Transfer in from: | 2B | Oxley | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 70054 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 92132 | Transfer in from: | 1H | Northampton | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 16/10/1965 | 44872 | Transfer in from: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | w/e | 23/10/1965 | 6697 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | w/e | 23/10/1965 | 6951 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | w/e | 23/10/1965 | 6952 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 03/01/1966 | 44840 | Transfer in from: | 21B | Bescot | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 03/01/1966 | 44914 | Transfer in from: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 03/01/1966 | 45222 | Transfer in from: | 2F | Bescot | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 03/01/1966 | 45324 | Transfer in from: | 2F | Bescot | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 03/01/1966 | 92074 | Transfer out to: | 2E | Saltley | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 08/01/1966 | 70045 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 08/01/1966 | 70046 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 08/01/1966 | 70047 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 08/01/1966 | 70050 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 08/01/1966 | 70051 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 08/01/1966 | 70052 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 08/01/1966 | 70053 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 08/01/1966 | 70054 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 12/02/1966 | 45418 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 19/02/1966 | 44936 | Transfer out to: | 16B | Colwick | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 19/02/1966 | 45114 | Transfer out to: | 16B | Colwick | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 19/02/1966 | 45222 | Transfer out to: | 16B | Colwick | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 19/02/1966 | 45288 | Transfer out to: | 16B | Colwick | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 19/02/1966 | 45324 | Transfer out to: | 16B | Colwick | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 19/02/1966 | 45392 | Transfer out to: | 16B | Colwick | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 19/02/1966 | 45426 | Transfer out to: | 16B | Colwick | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 19/02/1966 | 45454 | Transfer out to: | 16B | Colwick | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 12/03/1966 | D3112 | Transfer out to: | 2F | Bescot | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 26/03/1966 | 46522 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 02/04/1966 | 46522 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 30/04/1966 | 73013 | Transfer out to: | 9K | Bolton | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 30/04/1966 | 73014 | Transfer out to: | 9K | Bolton | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 30/04/1966 | 73048 | Transfer out to: | 9K | Bolton | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 28/05/1966 | 44869 | Transfer out to: | 9F | Heaton Mersey | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 16/07/1966 | 46522 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 13/08/1966 | 92132 | Transfer out to: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 13/08/1966 | 92224 | Transfer out to: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 20/08/1966 | 44710 | Transfer out to: | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 20/08/1966 | 45331 | Transfer out to: | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/09/1966 | 44840 | Transfer out to: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/09/1966 | 45089 | Transfer out to: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 10/09/1966 | 92013 | Transfer out to: | 2E | Saltley | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 10/09/1966 | 92128 | Transfer out to: | 2E | Saltley | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 17/09/1966 | 44860 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 17/09/1966 | 44942 | Transfer out to: | 6D | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 17/09/1966 | 45493 | Transfer out to: | 6D | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 17/09/1966 | 92073 | Transfer out to: | 8H | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 17/09/1966 | 92129 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 17/09/1966 | 92203 | Transfer out to: | 8H | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 17/09/1966 | 92247 | Transfer out to: | 9D | Newton Heath | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 08/10/1966 | D3105 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Tyseley | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 08/10/1966 | D3106 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Tyseley | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 08/10/1966 | D3108 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Tyseley | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 08/10/1966 | D3109 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Tyseley | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 08/10/1966 | D3110 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 08/10/1966 | 44872 | Transfer out to: | 6C | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 08/10/1966 | 44914 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Oxley | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 08/10/1966 | 45299 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 08/10/1966 | 45308 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 08/10/1966 | 92030 | Transfer out to: | 2E | Saltley | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 08/10/1966 | 92234 | Transfer out to: | 2E | Saltley | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 15/10/1966 | 46522 | Transfer out to: | 10A | Carnforth | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 15/10/1966 | 92004 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 15/10/1966 | 92067 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 15/10/1966 | 92213 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 15/10/1966 | 92218 | Transfer out to: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 15/10/1966 | 92227 | Transfer out to: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 15/10/1966 | 92228 | Transfer out to: | 8C | Speke Junction |