Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 98 Today
» 1103 Yesterday
» 5735 Week
» 18839 Month
» 18839 Year
» 1240404 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Melton Constable


Type Class Wheels Period Date Number Event Code Depot Length of Stay Notes
Steam D2 4-4-0 01/01/1948 2155 Snapshot        
Steam D2 4-4-0 01/01/1948 2156 Snapshot        
Steam D2 4-4-0 01/01/1948 2157 Snapshot        
Steam D2 4-4-0 01/01/1948 2189 Snapshot        
Steam D2 4-4-0 01/01/1948 2195 Snapshot        
Steam D2 4-4-0 01/01/1948 2197 Snapshot        
Steam D16 4-4-0 01/01/1948 2515 Snapshot        
Steam D15 4-4-0 01/01/1948 2520 Snapshot        
Steam D15 4-4-0 01/01/1948 2528 Snapshot        
Steam D16 4-4-0 01/01/1948 2533 Snapshot        
Steam D16 4-4-0 01/01/1948 2562 Snapshot        
Steam D16 4-4-0 01/01/1948 2578 Snapshot        
Steam J17 0-6-0 01/01/1948 5509 Snapshot        
Steam J17 0-6-0 01/01/1948 5514 Snapshot        
Steam J17 0-6-0 01/01/1948 5551 Snapshot        
Steam J17 0-6-0 01/01/1948 5552 Snapshot        
Steam J17 0-6-0 01/01/1948 5557 Snapshot        
Steam J17 0-6-0 01/01/1948 5566 Snapshot        
Steam J17 0-6-0 01/01/1948 5567 Snapshot        
Steam J17 0-6-0 01/01/1948 5586 Snapshot        
Steam F3 2-4-2T 01/01/1948 7140 Snapshot        
Steam F3 2-4-2T 01/01/1948 7150 Snapshot        
Steam F4 2-4-2T 01/01/1948 7152 Snapshot        
Steam F4 2-4-2T 01/01/1948 7153 Snapshot        
Steam C12 4-4-2T 01/01/1948 7354 Snapshot        
Steam J69 0-6-0T 01/01/1948 8570 Snapshot        
Steam J17 0-6-0 w/e 24/01/1948 5551 Transfer out to: YB Yarmouth Beach    
Steam D2 4-4-0 26/02/1948 2155 Condemned      
Steam D2 4-4-0 26/02/1948 2195 Condemned      
Steam D2 4-4-0 08/04/1948 2157 Condemned      
Steam J69 0-6-0T w/e 24/04/1948 8570 Transfer out to: NOR Norwich Thorpe    
Steam F3 2-4-2T w/e 08/05/1948 7140 Transfer out to: IPS Ipswich    
Steam F3 2-4-2T w/e 08/05/1948 7150 Transfer out to: IPS Ipswich    
Steam C12 4-4-2T w/e 07/08/1948 67354 Transfer out to: CAM Cambridge    
Steam D2 4-4-0 25/11/1948 2189 Condemned      
Steam D2 4-4-0 m/e 01/1949 62156 Condemned      
Steam D2 4-4-0 m/e 01/1949 62197 Condemned      
Steam F6 2-4-2T m/e 30/11/1949 67225 Transfer in from: STR Stratford    
Steam F6 2-4-2T m/e 30/11/1949 7228 Transfer in from: STR Stratford    
Steam F6 2-4-2T w/e 10/12/1949 7228 Transfer out to:        
Steam F4 2-4-2T w/e 31/12/1949 67153 Transfer out to: MAR March    
Steam J17 0-6-0 3w/e 31/05/1950 65566 Transfer out to: 32C Lowestoft    
Steam N7 0-6-2T 4w/e 23/12/1950 69708 Transfer in from: IPS Ipswich    
Steam J17 0-6-0 4w/e 19/05/1951 65514 Transfer out to: 32C Lowestoft    
Steam D15 4-4-0 m/e 06/1951 62528 Condemned      
Steam D16 4-4-0 5w/e 23/06/1951 62617 Transfer in from:        
Steam J66 0-6-0T 5w/e 23/06/1951 68388 Transfer in from: STR Stratford    
Steam D16 4-4-0 4w/e 21/07/1951 62608 Transfer in from: 32A Norwich Thorpe    
Steam F4 2-4-2T 4w/e 21/07/1951 67152 Transfer out to: 32E Yarmouth Vauxhall    
Steam D15 4-4-0 m/e 08/1951 62520 Condemned      
Steam D16 4-4-0 5w/e 22/09/1951 62610 Transfer in from: NOR Norwich Thorpe    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 28/09/1951 43146 1st Allocation        
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 08/10/1951 43147 1st Allocation        
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 17/10/1951 43148 1st Allocation        
Steam J17 0-6-0 4w/e 20/10/1951 65574 Transfer in from: YB Yarmouth Beach    
Steam F6 2-4-2T 4w/e 20/10/1951 67224 Transfer in from: 32A Norwich Thorpe    
Steam N7 0-6-2T 4w/e 20/10/1951 69708 Transfer out to: 32A Norwich Thorpe    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 28/12/1951 43155 1st Allocation        
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 07/01/1952 43156 1st Allocation        
Steam D16 4-4-0 4w/e 19/01/1952 62608 Transfer out to: 32A Norwich Thorpe    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 5w/e 16/02/1952 43145 Transfer in from: 32F Yarmouth Beach    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 5w/e 16/02/1952 43156 Transfer out to: 32F Yarmouth Beach    
Steam J17 0-6-0 5w/e 16/02/1952 65509 Transfer out to: 32F Yarmouth Beach    
Steam J17 0-6-0 5w/e 16/02/1952 65552 Transfer out to: 30A Stratford    
Steam J66 0-6-0T m/e 04/1952 68388 Condemned      
Steam D16 4-4-0 4w/e 19/04/1952 62562 Transfer out to: 32A Norwich Thorpe    
Steam J69 0-6-0T 4w/e 17/05/1952 68623 Transfer in from: 32A Norwich Thorpe    
Steam F6 2-4-2T 4w/e 19/07/1952 67229 Transfer in from:        
Steam J17 0-6-0 4w/e 19/07/1952 65586 Transfer out to: 32C Lowestoft    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 4w/e 18/10/1952 43156 Transfer in from: 32F Yarmouth Beach    
Steam D16 4-4-0 4w/e 25/07/1953 62592 Transfer in from: 32A Norwich Thorpe    
Steam J67 0-6-0T 4w/e 22/08/1953 68515 Transfer in from: 31D South Lynn    
Steam J69 0-6-0T 4w/e 22/08/1953 68623 Transfer out to: 31D South Lynn    
Steam D16 4-4-0 4w/e 19/09/1953 62592 Transfer out to: 32A Norwich Thorpe    
Steam D16 4-4-0 4w/e 19/12/1953 62596 Transfer in from: 32A Norwich Thorpe    
Steam J17 0-6-0 4w/e 23/01/1954 65509 Transfer in from: 32A Norwich Thorpe    
Steam D16 4-4-0 4w/e 23/01/1954 62596 Transfer out to: 32A Norwich Thorpe    
Steam J17 0-6-0 4w/e 23/01/1954 65557 Transfer out to: 32A Norwich Thorpe    
Steam D16 4-4-0 5w/e 24/04/1954 62564 Transfer in from: 32A Norwich Thorpe    
Steam J17 0-6-0 4w/e 22/05/1954 65551 Transfer in from: 32A Norwich Thorpe    
Steam D16 4-4-0 5w/e 24/07/1954 62564 Transfer out to: 32A Norwich Thorpe    
Steam F6 2-4-2T 4w/e 25/09/1954 67229 Transfer out to: 32D Yarmouth South Town    
Steam J39 0-6-0 07/11/1954 64900 Transfer in from: 32A Norwich Thorpe    
Steam J65 0-6-0T 4w/e 13/11/1954 68214 Transfer in from: NOR Norwich Thorpe    
Steam J65 0-6-0T 6w/e 25/12/1954 68214 Transfer out to: 32F Yarmouth Beach    
Steam J39 0-6-0 06/03/1955 64900 Transfer out to: 32A Norwich Thorpe    
Steam J17 0-6-0 m/e 04/1955 65574 Condemned      
Steam D16 4-4-0 5w/e 23/04/1955 62592 Transfer in from: 32F Yarmouth Beach    
Steam D16 4-4-0 3w/e 14/05/1955 62592 Transfer out to: 32A Norwich Thorpe    
Steam D16 4-4-0 5w/e 22/10/1955 62561 Transfer in from: 32A Norwich Thorpe    
Steam J17 0-6-0 5w/e 22/10/1955 65567 Transfer in from: MC Melton Constable    
Steam J17 0-6-0 5w/e 22/10/1955 65567 Transfer out to: 32G Melton Constable    
Steam J17 0-6-0 3w/e 12/11/1955 65514 Transfer in from: 32A Norwich Thorpe    
Steam D16 4-4-0 3w/e 12/11/1955 62610 Transfer out to: 31A Cambridge    
Steam F6 2-4-2T 5w/e 17/12/1955 67224 Transfer out to: 32C Lowestoft    
Steam F6 2-4-2T 5w/e 17/12/1955 67225 Transfer out to: 30E Colchester    
Steam J69 0-6-0T 5w/e 21/01/1956 68625 Transfer in from: 31A Cambridge    
Steam J39 0-6-0 22/04/1956 64913 Transfer in from: NOR Norwich Thorpe    
Steam J39 0-6-0 07/10/1956 64913 Transfer out to: 32A Norwich Thorpe    
Steam J17 0-6-0 4w/e 20/10/1956 65557 Transfer in from: 32F Yarmouth Beach    
Steam J67 0-6-0T m/e 01/1957 68515 Condemned      
Steam J39 0-6-0 06/01/1957 64802 Transfer in from: 32A Norwich Thorpe    
Steam J39 0-6-0 06/01/1957 64913 Transfer in from: 32A Norwich Thorpe    
Steam J39 0-6-0 03/02/1957 64913 Transfer out to: 32A Norwich Thorpe    
Steam J17 0-6-0 4w/e 16/03/1957 65588 Transfer in from: 32A Norwich Thorpe    
Steam J17 0-6-0 4w/e 16/03/1957 65514 Transfer out to: 30A Stratford    
Steam J17 0-6-0 4w/e 16/03/1957 65557 Transfer out to: 32A Norwich Thorpe    
Steam D16 4-4-0 m/e 05/1957 62617 Condemned      
Steam J39 0-6-0 12/05/1957 64968 Transfer in from: 32A Norwich Thorpe    
Steam D16 4-4-0 4w/e 18/05/1957 62597 Transfer in from: 32F Yarmouth Beach    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 5w/e 20/07/1957 43086 Transfer in from: 35A New England    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 5w/e 20/07/1957 43089 Transfer in from: 31A Cambridge    
Steam J39 0-6-0 28/07/1957 64968 Transfer out to: 32A Norwich Thorpe    
Steam D16 4-4-0 m/e 09/1957 62533 Condemned      
Steam D16 4-4-0 m/e 10/1957 62578 Condemned      
Steam J39 0-6-0 13/10/1957 64802 Transfer out to: 32A Norwich Thorpe    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 4w/e 19/10/1957 43086 Transfer out to: 35A New England    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 4w/e 19/10/1957 43089 Transfer out to: 31A Cambridge    
Steam J17 0-6-0 4w/e 19/10/1957 65509 Transfer out to: 32A Norwich Thorpe    
Steam D16 4-4-0 m/e 02/1958 62561 Condemned      
Diesel 05 0-6-0 4w/e 08/03/1958 11170 Transfer in from: 32A Norwich Thorpe    
Diesel 05 0-6-0 4w/e 08/03/1958 11176 Transfer in from: 32A Norwich Thorpe    
Steam D16 4-4-0 m/e 04/1958 62515 Condemned      
Diesel 05 0-6-0 4w/e 10/05/1958 11172 Transfer in from: 32A Norwich Thorpe    
Steam J39 0-6-0 15/06/1958 64726 Transfer in from: 32B Ipswich    
Steam J69 0-6-0T 4w/e 19/07/1958 68625 Transfer out to: 32D Yarmouth South Town    
Steam J39 0-6-0 19/10/1958 64726 Transfer out to: 32C Lowestoft    
Steam J17 0-6-0 5w/e 15/11/1958 65567 Transfer out to: 32C Lowestoft    
Steam J17 0-6-0 5w/e 15/11/1958 65588 Transfer out to: 32C Lowestoft    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 07/03/1959 43145 Transfer out to: 32A Norwich Thorpe    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 07/03/1959 43146 Transfer out to: 32A Norwich Thorpe    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 07/03/1959 43147 Transfer out to: 40F Boston    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 07/03/1959 43148 Transfer out to: 30A Stratford    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 07/03/1959 43155 Transfer out to: 40F Boston    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 07/03/1959 43156 Transfer out to: 32A Norwich Thorpe    
Steam D16 4-4-0 w/e 07/03/1959 62597 Transfer out to: 32A Norwich Thorpe    
Steam J17 0-6-0 w/e 07/03/1959 65551 Transfer out to: 32A Norwich Thorpe