Depot: Northwich
Type | Class | Wheels | Period | Date | Number | Event | Code | Depot | Length of Stay | Notes |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | m/e | 11/1935 | 5908 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | C13 | 4-4-2T | m/e | 12/1935 | 5457 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | m/e | 12/1935 | 5902 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | m/e | 12/1935 | 5904 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | J10 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 01/1936 | 5837 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | C13 | 4-4-2T | m/e | 01/1936 | 6057 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | D10 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2650 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D10 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2652 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D10 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2655 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | C13 | 4-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7402 | Snapshot | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | C13 | 4-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7430 | Snapshot | CHR | Chester Northgate | ||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9262 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9293 | Snapshot | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9326 | Snapshot | WRX | Wrexham Rhosddu | ||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9328 | Snapshot | STP | Heaton Mersey | ||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9332 | Snapshot | STP | Heaton Mersey | ||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9335 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9349 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D2 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 10/01/1948 | 4367 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 24/01/1948 | 4453 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | J10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 24/01/1948 | 5153 | Transfer in from: | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | ||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 07/02/1948 | 9349 | Transfer out to: | ||||
Steam | D10 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 23/10/1948 | 62658 | Transfer in from: | LIV | Brunswick | ||
Steam | C13 | 4-4-2T | w/e | 23/10/1948 | 67433 | Transfer in from: | WRX | Wrexham Rhosddu | ||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | m/e | 30/11/1949 | 69308 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/01/1950 | 44494 | Transfer in from: | 5E | Alsager | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 44494 | Transfer in from: | NTH | Northwich | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 48045 | Transfer in from: | 13D | Shoeburyness | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 48046 | Transfer in from: | 13D | Shoeburyness | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 48555 | Transfer in from: | 13D | Shoeburyness | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 48706 | Transfer in from: | 24A | Accrington | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 14/01/1950 | 48718 | Transfer in from: | 24C | Lostock Hall | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 8756 | Transfer in from: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 44494 | Transfer out to: | NTH | Northwich | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 11/03/1950 | 48135 | Transfer in from: | 19D | Heaton Mersey | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 15/04/1950 | 48717 | Transfer in from: | 19D | Heaton Mersey | ||
Steam | C13 | 4-4-2T | m/e | 30/04/1950 | 67433 | Transfer out to: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 03/06/1950 | 48667 | Transfer in from: | 19D | Heaton Mersey | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 48667 | Transfer in from: | 9G | Northwich | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 48667 | Transfer out to: | 9G | Northwich | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/08/1950 | 48613 | Transfer in from: | 4A | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 02/09/1950 | 69293 | Transfer out to: | 6D | Chester Northgate | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 48258 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 28/10/1950 | 64376 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 48254 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 44494 | Transfer out to: | 8E | Brunswick | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 48011 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 48340 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 48605 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 48706 | Transfer out to: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 48718 | Transfer out to: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 48756 | Transfer out to: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 48011 | Transfer in from: | 9G | Northwich | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 48340 | Transfer in from: | 9G | Northwich | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 48011 | Transfer out to: | 9G | Northwich | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 48340 | Transfer out to: | 9G | Northwich | ||
Steam | D10 | 4-4-0 | m/e | 31/12/1950 | 62655 | Transfer in from: | NTH | Northwich | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 48258 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | D10 | 4-4-0 | m/e | 31/12/1950 | 62655 | Transfer out to: | 9G | Northwich | ||
Steam | D10 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 24/02/1951 | 62651 | Transfer in from: | TFD | Trafford Park (LNER) | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 48254 | Transfer in from: | 9G | Northwich | ||
Steam | D10 | 4-4-0 | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 62651 | Transfer in from: | 9G | Northwich | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 48254 | Transfer out to: | 9G | Northwich | ||
Steam | D10 | 4-4-0 | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 62651 | Transfer out to: | 9G | Northwich | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 48296 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/04/1951 | 64901 | Transfer in from: | TFD | Trafford Park (LNER) | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/04/1951 | 64954 | Transfer in from: | TFD | Trafford Park (LNER) | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/04/1951 | 64901 | Transfer in from: | 9G | Northwich | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/04/1951 | 64954 | Transfer in from: | 9G | Northwich | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/04/1951 | 64901 | Transfer out to: | 9G | Northwich | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/04/1951 | 64954 | Transfer out to: | 9G | Northwich | ||
Steam | J10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 14/04/1951 | 65131 | Transfer in from: | 10F | Lower Ince | ||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 49435 | Transfer in from: | 2D | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 48296 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 42061 | Transfer in from: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 42061 | Transfer out to: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 48046 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 18/08/1951 | 49144 | Transfer in from: | 11A | Carnforth | ||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 01/09/1951 | 49405 | Transfer in from: | 2D | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 01/09/1951 | 49144 | Transfer out to: | 4A | Bletchley | ||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 49405 | Transfer in from: | 9G | Northwich | ||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 49405 | Transfer out to: | 9G | Northwich | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 48135 | Transfer out to: | 9F | Heaton Mersey | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 29/09/1951 | 48046 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 44341 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 48046 | Transfer in from: | 9G | Northwich | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 48046 | Transfer out to: | 9G | Northwich | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 48711 | Transfer in from: | 17A | Derby | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 48011 | Transfer out to: | 17A | Derby | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 48680 | Transfer in from: | 19G | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 48711 | Transfer in from: | 9G | Northwich | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 48711 | Transfer out to: | 9G | Northwich | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 48667 | Transfer out to: | 9F | Heaton Mersey | ||
Steam | J10 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 65162 | Transfer out to: | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 48680 | Transfer out to: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | Large/Scottish Director | 4-4-0 | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 62669 | Transfer in from: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 64288 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 12/10/1952 | 64901 | Transfer out to: | 35C | Spital Bridge | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 12/10/1952 | 64954 | Transfer out to: | 35C | Spital Bridge | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/10/1952 | 64288 | Transfer out to: | 35C | Spital Bridge | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/10/1952 | 64376 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/10/1952 | 64453 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 44456 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 43538 | Transfer in from: | 35C | Spital Bridge | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 43651 | Transfer in from: | 16B | Spital Bridge | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 44117 | Transfer in from: | 16B | Spital Bridge | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 44155 | Transfer in from: | 16B | Spital Bridge | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 44456 | Transfer in from: | 9G | Northwich | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 48736 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 44456 | Transfer out to: | 9G | Northwich | ||
Steam | J10 | 0-6-0 | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 65153 | Transfer out to: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 69262 | Transfer out to: | 9F | Heaton Mersey | ||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 69335 | Transfer out to: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 3w/e | 24/01/1953 | 48736 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | D10 | 4-4-0 | on | 09/03/1953 | 62651 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | D10 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 62659 | Transfer in from: | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | D10 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 22/08/1953 | 62655 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 05/09/1953 | 49094 | Transfer in from: | 10C | Patricroft | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 48155 | Transfer in from: | 19D | Heaton Mersey | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 48521 | Transfer in from: | 9F | Heaton Mersey | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 49094 | Transfer out to: | 10C | Patricroft | ||
Steam | D10 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 24/10/1953 | 62656 | Transfer in from: | TFD | Trafford Park (LNER) | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 48445 | Transfer in from: | 2C | Northampton | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 44117 | Transfer out to: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 28/11/1953 | 48426 | Transfer in from: | 2E | Northampton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 28/11/1953 | 48445 | Transfer out to: | 2E | Northampton | ||
Steam | D10 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 10/02/1954 | 62650 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | D10 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 27/02/1954 | 62653 | Transfer in from: | LIV | Brunswick | ||
Steam | D10 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 08/05/1954 | 62652 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | D10 | 4-4-0 | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 62658 | Transfer in from: | NTH | Northwich | ||
Steam | D10 | 4-4-0 | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 62658 | Transfer out to: | 9G | Northwich | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 11/09/1954 | 42566 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 11/09/1954 | 49304 | Transfer in from: | 2B | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 48742 | Transfer in from: | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | ||
Steam | D10 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 27/11/1954 | 62659 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Large/Scottish Director | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 62665 | Transfer in from: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 42566 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | D10 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 29/01/1955 | 62656 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Large/Scottish Director | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 26/03/1955 | 62661 | Transfer in from: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | Large/Scottish Director | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 26/03/1955 | 62664 | Transfer in from: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 23/04/1955 | 48292 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 23/04/1955 | 69255 | Transfer in from: | TFD | Trafford Park (LNER) | ||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 5w/e | 23/04/1955 | 69308 | Transfer out to: | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 21/05/1955 | 48292 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 8w/e | 16/07/1955 | 69255 | Transfer out to: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | D10 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 13/08/1955 | 62658 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 48630 | Transfer in from: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | Large/Scottish Director | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 62662 | Transfer in from: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | D10 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 08/10/1955 | 62653 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 48630 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1955 | 48506 | Transfer in from: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1955 | 49405 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1955 | 49435 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 28/01/1956 | 48368 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/02/1956 | 43207 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/02/1956 | 44341 | Transfer out to: | 8E | Brunswick | ||
Steam | J10 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/02/1956 | 65131 | Transfer out to: | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 19/05/1956 | 42467 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 19/05/1956 | 42575 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 44341 | Transfer in from: | 8E | Brunswick | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 48556 | Transfer in from: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 43207 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1956 | 48556 | Transfer out to: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 23/03/1957 | 48135 | Transfer in from: | 6D | Chester Northgate | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 23/03/1957 | 48296 | Transfer in from: | 6D | Chester Northgate | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 23/03/1957 | 42575 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 20/04/1957 | 48693 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 20/04/1957 | 49304 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 07/09/1957 | 48203 | Transfer in from: | 18A | Toton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 07/09/1957 | 48613 | Transfer out to: | 18A | Toton | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 42440 | Transfer in from: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 42449 | Transfer in from: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 48203 | Transfer out to: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 28/12/1957 | 42542 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 42440 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 42449 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 42467 | Transfer out to: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 42542 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 17/05/1958 | 48296 | Transfer out to: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 17/05/1958 | 48693 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 44688 | Transfer in from: | 27A | Bank Hall | ||
Steam | Large/Scottish Director | 4-4-0 | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 62661 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | Large/Scottish Director | 4-4-0 | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 62662 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | Large/Scottish Director | 4-4-0 | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 62664 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | Large/Scottish Director | 4-4-0 | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 62665 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | Large/Scottish Director | 4-4-0 | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 62669 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/08/1958 | 44688 | Transfer out to: | 17A | Derby | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 48139 | Transfer in from: | 9G | Gorton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 48709 | Transfer in from: | 9G | Gorton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 15/11/1958 | 48017 | Transfer in from: | 8D | Widnes | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 15/11/1958 | 48462 | Transfer in from: | 8D | Widnes | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 15/11/1958 | 48709 | Transfer out to: | 8D | Widnes | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 22/11/1958 | 48506 | Transfer out to: | 8D | Widnes | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 17/01/1959 | 43538 | Transfer out to: | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 17/01/1959 | 43651 | Transfer out to: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 31/01/1959 | 48297 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 18/04/1959 | 42393 | Transfer in from: | 11D | Tebay | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 48046 | Transfer out to: | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 48297 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 11/07/1959 | 42574 | Transfer in from: | 10C | Patricroft | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 11/07/1959 | 42576 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 08/08/1959 | 42574 | Transfer out to: | 26F | Patricroft | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 08/08/1959 | 42576 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 15/08/1959 | 42359 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 15/08/1959 | 42365 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 48764 | Transfer in from: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 1142 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 14/11/1959 | 58120 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 1142 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 14/11/1959 | 58123 | Transfer in from: | 11B | Barrow in Furness | ||
Steam | 1142 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 21/11/1959 | 58120 | Transfer out to: | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | 1142 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 21/11/1959 | 58123 | Transfer out to: | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 28/11/1959 | 78038 | Transfer in from: | 6K | Rhyl | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 28/11/1959 | 78057 | Transfer in from: | 6H | Bangor | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/12/1959 | 48465 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 26/12/1959 | 48632 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 48465 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 27/02/1960 | 48632 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 09/04/1960 | 48166 | Transfer in from: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 09/04/1960 | 48250 | Transfer in from: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 14/05/1960 | 48250 | Transfer out to: | 21B | Bescot | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 21/05/1960 | 48683 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 21/05/1960 | 48742 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 28/05/1960 | 48039 | Transfer in from: | 8D | Widnes | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 28/05/1960 | 48479 | Transfer in from: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 28/05/1960 | 48139 | Transfer out to: | 8D | Widnes | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 28/05/1960 | 48166 | Transfer out to: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 28/05/1960 | 48368 | Transfer out to: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 04/06/1960 | 48511 | Transfer in from: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 48268 | Transfer in from: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 48479 | Transfer out to: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 02/07/1960 | 42362 | Transfer in from: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 02/07/1960 | 48268 | Transfer out to: | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 30/07/1960 | 42422 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 13/08/1960 | 42303 | Transfer in from: | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | 1142 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 13/08/1960 | 58120 | Transfer in from: | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 20/08/1960 | 42340 | Transfer in from: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 20/08/1960 | 42422 | Transfer out to: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 10/09/1960 | 42362 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 1142 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 10/09/1960 | 58120 | Transfer out to: | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 78055 | Transfer in from: | 6K | Rhyl | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 42340 | Transfer out to: | 9C | Macclesfield | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 01/10/1960 | 48631 | Transfer in from: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 08/10/1960 | 42365 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 15/10/1960 | 42303 | Transfer out to: | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 05/11/1960 | 42340 | Transfer in from: | 9C | Macclesfield | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 05/11/1960 | 48248 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 05/11/1960 | 48255 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/11/1960 | 48248 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/11/1960 | 48255 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 19/11/1960 | 42369 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 11/02/1961 | 48045 | Transfer out to: | 18A | Toton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 29/04/1961 | 48045 | Transfer in from: | 18A | Toton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 06/05/1961 | 48166 | Transfer in from: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 78019 | Transfer in from: | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 42340 | Transfer out to: | 12E | Barrow in Furness | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 42359 | Transfer out to: | 24L | Carnforth | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 42369 | Transfer out to: | 12G | Oxenholme | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 42393 | Transfer out to: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 48045 | Transfer out to: | 8D | Widnes | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 48711 | Transfer out to: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 40086 | Transfer in from: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 12/08/1961 | 40086 | Transfer out to: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 13/01/1962 | 48555 | Transfer out to: | 21B | Bescot | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 07/04/1962 | 48118 | Transfer in from: | 18A | Toton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 22/09/1962 | 48740 | Transfer in from: | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 17/11/1962 | 78055 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/02/1963 | 44341 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 16/03/1963 | 48727 | Transfer in from: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 06/04/1963 | 48716 | Transfer in from: | 26F | Patricroft | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 11/05/1963 | 78057 | Transfer out to: | 27D | Wigan Central (L&Y) | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 46472 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 46503 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 46517 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 48333 | Transfer in from: | 16D | Annesley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 48615 | Transfer in from: | 16D | Annesley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 48166 | Transfer out to: | 16D | Annesley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 48727 | Transfer out to: | 16D | Annesley | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 78019 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 78038 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 06/07/1963 | 48426 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 19/10/1963 | 48333 | Transfer out to: | 9M | Bury | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 25/01/1964 | 48702 | Transfer in from: | 9F | Heaton Mersey | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 14/03/1964 | 48640 | Transfer in from: | 16A | Nottingham | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 14/03/1964 | 48254 | Transfer out to: | 16D | Nottingham | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 48639 | Transfer in from: | 10C | Fleetwood | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 08/08/1964 | 46472 | Transfer out to: | 9D | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 08/08/1964 | 46503 | Transfer out to: | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 08/08/1964 | 46517 | Transfer out to: | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 22/08/1964 | 48039 | Transfer out to: | 9L | Buxton (LNWR) | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 22/08/1964 | 48511 | Transfer out to: | 9K | Bolton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 22/08/1964 | 48702 | Transfer out to: | 9K | Bolton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 22/08/1964 | 48740 | Transfer out to: | 9K | Bolton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 19/09/1964 | 48521 | Transfer out to: | 9H | Patricroft | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 | 2-6-0 | on | 01/11/1964 | 77011 | Transfer in from: | 55B | Stourton | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 | 2-6-0 | on | 01/11/1964 | 77014 | Transfer in from: | 55B | Stourton | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 05/12/1964 | 44155 | Transfer out to: | 2F | Bescot | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 19/12/1964 | 44456 | Transfer out to: | 10G | Skipton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 13/02/1965 | 48017 | Transfer out to: | 8H | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 13/02/1965 | 48340 | Transfer out to: | 8H | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 13/02/1965 | 48605 | Transfer out to: | 8H | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 13/02/1965 | 48716 | Transfer out to: | 8H | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 20/03/1965 | 48735 | Transfer in from: | 10D | Lostock Hall | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 17/04/1965 | 48221 | Transfer in from: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 48221 | Transfer out to: | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 48764 | Transfer out to: | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 10/07/1965 | 48374 | Transfer in from: | 15A | Leicester Midland | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 24/07/1965 | 48305 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 11/09/1965 | 48135 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 18/09/1965 | 48057 | Transfer in from: | 10F | Rose Grove | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 18/09/1965 | 48398 | Transfer in from: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 18/09/1965 | 48408 | Transfer in from: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 18/09/1965 | 48305 | Transfer out to: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 18/09/1965 | 48374 | Transfer out to: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 05/02/1966 | 48615 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 3 | 2-6-0 | on | 05/02/1966 | 77011 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 19/02/1966 | 46487 | Transfer in from: | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 05/03/1966 | 46405 | Transfer in from: | 8K | Bank Hall | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 05/03/1966 | 46414 | Transfer in from: | 8K | Bank Hall | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/03/1966 | 48151 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 02/04/1966 | 48100 | Transfer in from: | 16C | Kirkby in Ashfield | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 02/04/1966 | 48215 | Transfer in from: | 16B | Kirkby in Ashfield | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 02/04/1966 | 48334 | Transfer in from: | 16C | Kirkby in Ashfield | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 02/04/1966 | 48643 | Transfer in from: | 16B | Kirkby in Ashfield | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 02/04/1966 | 77014 | Transfer out to: | 70C | Guildford | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 02/04/1966 | 48398 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 23/04/1966 | 48215 | Transfer out to: | 8G | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 11/06/1966 | 46414 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 11/06/1966 | 48118 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 18/06/1966 | 46440 | Transfer in from: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 25/06/1966 | 48545 | Transfer in from: | 15A | Leicester Midland | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 03/09/1966 | 48271 | Transfer in from: | 17B | Burton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 17/09/1966 | 48272 | Transfer in from: | 16G | Westhouses | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 17/09/1966 | 48155 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 24/09/1966 | 48681 | Transfer in from: | 16F | Burton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 24/09/1966 | 48699 | Transfer in from: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 15/10/1966 | 46520 | Transfer in from: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/11/1966 | 48304 | Transfer in from: | 16E | Kirkby in Ashfield | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 19/11/1966 | 46503 | Transfer in from: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 19/11/1966 | 46516 | Transfer in from: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 19/11/1966 | 48462 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | m/e | 12/1966 | 46405 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 04/02/1967 | 48685 | Transfer in from: | 16B | Colwick | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 18/02/1967 | 48063 | Transfer in from: | 16E | Kirkby in Ashfield | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 18/02/1967 | 48545 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 18/03/1967 | 48036 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 18/03/1967 | 48632 | Transfer in from: | 6C | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 25/03/1967 | 46440 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 01/04/1967 | 48347 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 01/04/1967 | 48717 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 22/04/1967 | 48685 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 29/04/1967 | 48212 | Transfer in from: | 8L | Aintree | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 29/04/1967 | 48421 | Transfer in from: | 8L | Aintree | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | m/e | 05/1967 | 46516 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 06/05/1967 | 46487 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 06/05/1967 | 46503 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 06/05/1967 | 46520 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 13/05/1967 | 48363 | Transfer in from: | 8L | Aintree | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 13/05/1967 | 48650 | Transfer in from: | 8L | Aintree | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 13/05/1967 | 48057 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 13/05/1967 | 48640 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 20/05/1967 | 48617 | Transfer in from: | 8G | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 20/05/1967 | 48722 | Transfer in from: | 8G | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 20/05/1967 | 48727 | Transfer in from: | 8G | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 20/05/1967 | 48750 | Transfer in from: | 8G | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 03/06/1967 | 48085 | Transfer in from: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 10/06/1967 | 48643 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 17/06/1967 | 48340 | Transfer in from: | 8L | Aintree | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 22/07/1967 | 48681 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 29/07/1967 | 48347 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/08/1967 | 48085 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/08/1967 | 48271 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 19/08/1967 | 48650 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 16/09/1967 | 48699 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 30/09/1967 | 48100 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 14/10/1967 | 48735 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 11/11/1967 | 48408 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 18/11/1967 | 48363 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 13/01/1968 | 48151 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 20/01/1968 | 48750 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 27/01/1968 | 48334 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 03/02/1968 | 48493 | Transfer in from: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 03/02/1968 | 48063 | Transfer out to: | 9F | Heaton Mersey | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 03/02/1968 | 48212 | Transfer out to: | 9H | Patricroft | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 03/02/1968 | 48421 | Transfer out to: | 9F | Heaton Mersey | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 03/02/1968 | 48683 | Transfer out to: | 9F | Heaton Mersey | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 03/02/1968 | 48639 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 24/02/1968 | 48631 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 02/03/1968 | 48272 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 02/03/1968 | 48304 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 02/03/1968 | 48617 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 02/03/1968 | 48632 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 09/03/1968 | 48340 | Transfer out to: | 10F | Rose Grove | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 09/03/1968 | 48493 | Transfer out to: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 09/03/1968 | 48722 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 09/03/1968 | 48727 | Transfer out to: | 10F | Rose Grove | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 09/03/1968 | 48036 | Condemned |