Depot: Norwood Junction
Type | Class | Wheels | Period | Date | Number | Event | Code | Depot | Length of Stay | Notes |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Diesel | D3/12 | 0-6-0 | y/e | 1941 | 1 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Diesel | D3/12 | 0-6-0 | y/e | 1941 | 2 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Diesel | D3/12 | 0-6-0 | q/e | 12/1945 | 1 | Transfer in from: | NORW | Norwood Junction | ||
Diesel | D3/12 | 0-6-0 | q/e | 12/1945 | 2 | Transfer in from: | NORW | Norwood Junction | ||
Diesel | D3/12 | 0-6-0 | q/e | 12/1945 | 1 | Transfer out to: | NORW | Norwood Junction | ||
Diesel | D3/12 | 0-6-0 | q/e | 12/1945 | 2 | Transfer out to: | NORW | Norwood Junction | ||
Diesel | D3/12 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 07/1946 | 3 | Transfer in from: | ELH | Eastleigh | ||
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1814 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1844 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | W | 2-6-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 1916 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | W | 2-6-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 1917 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | W | 2-6-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 1918 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | W | 2-6-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 1919 | Snapshot | HIT | Hither Green | ||
Steam | W | 2-6-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 1920 | Snapshot | HIT | Hither Green | ||
Steam | Small Radials | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2167 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Small Radials | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2169 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | C3 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2302 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | C3 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2309 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Moguls | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2350 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Moguls | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2351 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Large Radials | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2404 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | E6X | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2407 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | E6X | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2411 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | E6 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2414 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | E6 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2416 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | E6 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2417 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | E6 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2418 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Large Vulcans | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2440 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Large Vulcans | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2444 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Large Vulcans | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2447 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Small Radials | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2455 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Small Radials | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2456 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Small Radials | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2457 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | E4X | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2466 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Radials | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2473 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Radials | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2476 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | E4X | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2477 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | E4X | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2478 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Radials | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2479 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Radials | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2481 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | E4X | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2489 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Radials | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2493 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Radials | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2495 | Snapshot | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | Radials | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2498 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Radials | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2502 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Radials | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2506 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Large Vulcans | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2526 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Large Vulcans | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2535 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Large Vulcans | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2536 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Large Vulcans | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2540 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Large Vulcans | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2544 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Large Vulcans | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2547 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Radials | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2561 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Radials | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2563 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Radials | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2579 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | E6X | 0-6-2T | P | 02/01/1948 | 2407 | Transfer in from: | NORW | Norwood Junction | ||
Steam | E6X | 0-6-2T | P | 02/01/1948 | 2411 | Transfer in from: | NORW | Norwood Junction | ||
Steam | E6 | 0-6-2T | P | 02/01/1948 | 2416 | Transfer in from: | NORW | Norwood Junction | ||
Steam | E6 | 0-6-2T | P | 02/01/1948 | 2417 | Transfer in from: | NORW | Norwood Junction | ||
Steam | E6 | 0-6-2T | P | 02/01/1948 | 2418 | Transfer in from: | NORW | Norwood Junction | ||
Steam | E6X | 0-6-2T | P | 02/01/1948 | 2407 | Transfer out to: | NORW | Norwood Junction | ||
Steam | E6X | 0-6-2T | P | 02/01/1948 | 2411 | Transfer out to: | NORW | Norwood Junction | ||
Steam | E6 | 0-6-2T | P | 02/01/1948 | 2416 | Transfer out to: | NORW | Norwood Junction | ||
Steam | E6 | 0-6-2T | P | 02/01/1948 | 2417 | Transfer out to: | NORW | Norwood Junction | ||
Steam | E6 | 0-6-2T | P | 02/01/1948 | 2418 | Transfer out to: | NORW | Norwood Junction | ||
Steam | Radials | 0-6-2T | 9w/e | 01/03/1948 | 2578 | Transfer in from: | BA | Bricklayers Arms | ||
Steam | Radials | 0-6-2T | 9w/e | 01/03/1948 | 2481 | Transfer out to: | ELH | Eastleigh | ||
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/04/1948 | 1830 | Transfer in from: | TON | Tonbridge | ||
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/04/1948 | 1814 | Transfer out to: | BAT | Stewarts Lane | ||
Steam | Q | 0-6-0 | 9w/e | 01/08/1948 | 533 | Transfer in from: | RED | Redhill | ||
Steam | Q | 0-6-0 | 9w/e | 01/08/1948 | 537 | Transfer in from: | RED | Redhill | ||
Steam | Q | 0-6-0 | 9w/e | 01/08/1948 | 538 | Transfer in from: | RED | Redhill | ||
Steam | Q | 0-6-0 | 9w/e | 01/08/1948 | 539 | Transfer in from: | RED | Redhill | ||
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 9w/e | 01/08/1948 | 1830 | Transfer out to: | AFD | Ashford | ||
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 9w/e | 01/08/1948 | 1844 | Transfer out to: | AFD | Ashford | ||
Steam | Moguls | 2-6-0 | 9w/e | 01/08/1948 | 2350 | Transfer out to: | RED | Redhill | ||
Steam | Moguls | 2-6-0 | 9w/e | 01/08/1948 | 2351 | Transfer out to: | RED | Redhill | ||
Steam | Radials | 0-6-2T | 5w/e | 04/09/1948 | 32493 | Transfer out to: | 9E | Nine Elms | ||
Steam | Radials | 0-6-2T | 5w/e | 13/11/1948 | 2561 | Transfer out to: | RED | Redhill | ||
Steam | C3 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 01/1949 | 32309 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Moguls | 2-6-0 | 5w/e | 12/02/1949 | 2343 | Transfer in from: | BTN | Brighton | ||
Steam | Q | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 12/02/1949 | 549 | Transfer in from: | BM | Bournemouth | ||
Steam | Q | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 12/02/1949 | 30537 | Transfer out to: | BAT | Stewarts Lane | ||
Steam | Q | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 12/02/1949 | 30539 | Transfer out to: | BAT | Stewarts Lane | ||
Steam | Moguls | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/03/1949 | 2343 | Transfer out to: | BTN | Brighton | ||
Steam | Large Radials | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 12/03/1949 | 2404 | Transfer out to: | EBN | Eastbourne | ||
Steam | Small Radials | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 12/03/1949 | 2456 | Transfer out to: | TON | Tonbridge | ||
Steam | Large Vulcans | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/03/1949 | 2540 | Transfer out to: | RED | Redhill | ||
Steam | Radials | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 12/03/1949 | 2579 | Transfer out to: | ELH | Eastleigh | ||
Steam | Small Radials | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 12/03/1949 | 32457 | Transfer out to: | TON | Tonbridge | ||
Steam | Radials | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 12/03/1949 | 32563 | Transfer out to: | ELH | Eastleigh | ||
Steam | Q | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/03/1949 | 549 | Transfer out to: | BM | Bournemouth | ||
Steam | Q | 0-6-0 | 7w/e | 03/05/1949 | 547 | Transfer in from: | 3B | Three Bridges | ||
Steam | Small Radials | 0-6-2T | 7w/e | 03/05/1949 | 2169 | Transfer out to: | TON | Tonbridge | ||
Steam | Small Radials | 0-6-2T | 7w/e | 03/05/1949 | 2455 | Transfer out to: | BTN | Brighton | ||
Steam | Small Radials | 0-6-2T | 7w/e | 03/05/1949 | 32167 | Transfer out to: | TON | Tonbridge | ||
Steam | C3 | 0-6-0 | 7w/e | 03/05/1949 | 32302 | Transfer out to: | HOR | Horsham | ||
Diesel | 12 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/05/1949 | 15214 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 12 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/05/1949 | 15215 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 12 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 04/06/1949 | 15216 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 12 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 18/06/1949 | 15217 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | BULL1 | 0-6-0 | on | 05/1950 | 11001 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Q | 0-6-0 | m/e | 31/08/1950 | 30534 | Transfer in from: | TWW | Tunbridge Wells West | ||
Diesel | BULL1 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 09/1950 | 11001 | Transfer in from: | 75C | Norwood Junction | ||
Diesel | BULL1 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 09/1950 | 11001 | Transfer out to: | 75C | Norwood Junction | ||
Steam | Large Vulcans | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 32544 | Transfer out to: | 75D | Horsham | ||
Steam | Radials | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 2473 | Transfer out to: | 73B | Bricklayers Arms | ||
Steam | E6 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 32416 | Transfer out to: | 71A | Eastleigh | ||
Steam | Radials | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 32498 | Transfer out to: | 70A | Nine Elms | ||
Steam | Radials | 0-6-2T | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 32502 | Transfer out to: | 70A | Nine Elms | ||
Steam | Large Radials | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 08/12/1950 | 32592 | Transfer in from: | RED | Redhill | ||
Steam | Large Radials | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 05/02/1951 | 32592 | Transfer out to: | 73B | Bricklayers Arms | ||
Diesel | D3/12 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/04/1951 | 15202 | Transfer in from: | NORW | Norwood Junction | ||
Diesel | D3/12 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/04/1951 | 15203 | Transfer in from: | NORW | Norwood Junction | ||
Diesel | D3/12 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/04/1951 | 15202 | Transfer out to: | 75C | Norwood Junction | ||
Diesel | D3/12 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/04/1951 | 15203 | Transfer out to: | 75C | Norwood Junction | ||
Steam | Large Vulcans | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 32445 | Transfer in from: | 3B | Three Bridges | ||
Steam | Large Vulcans | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 32446 | Transfer in from: | BA | Bricklayers Arms | ||
Steam | Radials | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 32496 | Transfer in from: | NHN | Newhaven | ||
Steam | Large Vulcans | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 32544 | Transfer in from: | 75D | Horsham | ||
Steam | Large Vulcans | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 32545 | Transfer in from: | 3B | Three Bridges | ||
Steam | Large Vulcans | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 32440 | Transfer out to: | 75A | Brighton | ||
Steam | Radials | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 32506 | Transfer out to: | 75A | Brighton | ||
Steam | Large Vulcans | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 32526 | Transfer out to: | 75E | Three Bridges | ||
Steam | Large Vulcans | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 32535 | Transfer out to: | 75E | Three Bridges | ||
Steam | Large Vulcans | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 32536 | Transfer out to: | 75E | Three Bridges | ||
Steam | Large Vulcans | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/07/1951 | 32443 | Transfer in from: | BTN | Brighton | ||
Steam | Radials | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 32496 | Transfer out to: | 75A | Brighton | ||
Steam | Radials | 0-6-2T | w/e | 06/12/1951 | 32578 | Transfer out to: | 74D | Tonbridge | ||
Diesel | 12 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 15/12/1951 | 15235 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Radials | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/01/1952 | 32479 | Transfer out to: | 71D | Fratton | ||
Steam | Radials | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/01/1952 | 32495 | Transfer out to: | 71D | Fratton | ||
Diesel | 12 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/03/1952 | 15218 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Diesel | 12 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/03/1952 | 15219 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Diesel | 12 | 0-6-0 | 9w/e | 30/06/1952 | 15220 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Diesel | BULL1 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 07/1952 | 11001 | Transfer in from: | 75C | Norwood Junction | ||
Diesel | BULL1 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 07/1952 | 11001 | Transfer out to: | 75C | Norwood Junction | ||
Diesel | 10800 | Bo-Bo | on | 09/08/1952 | 10800 | Transfer in from: | 4A | Bletchley | ||
Steam | Large Vulcans | 0-6-0 | 8w/e | 07/10/1952 | 32543 | Transfer in from: | 75G | Eastbourne | ||
Diesel | 12 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 14/02/1953 | 15235 | Transfer out to: | 73C | Hither Green | ||
Steam | W | 2-6-4T | 5w/e | 14/02/1953 | 31916 | Transfer out to: | 73C | Hither Green | ||
Diesel | D3/12 | 0-6-0 | 8w/e | 20/07/1953 | 15202 | Transfer in from: | 75C | Norwood Junction | ||
Diesel | D3/12 | 0-6-0 | 8w/e | 20/07/1953 | 15203 | Transfer in from: | 75C | Norwood Junction | ||
Steam | Q | 0-6-0 | 8w/e | 20/07/1953 | 30540 | Transfer in from: | 3B | Three Bridges | ||
Diesel | D3/12 | 0-6-0 | 8w/e | 20/07/1953 | 15202 | Transfer out to: | 75C | Norwood Junction | ||
Diesel | D3/12 | 0-6-0 | 8w/e | 20/07/1953 | 15203 | Transfer out to: | 75C | Norwood Junction | ||
Diesel | 12 | 0-6-0 | 8w/e | 20/07/1953 | 15220 | Transfer out to: | 73C | Hither Green | ||
Steam | E6 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 01/10/1953 | 32413 | Transfer in from: | 71A | Eastleigh | ||
Steam | E6 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 01/10/1953 | 32416 | Transfer in from: | 71A | Eastleigh | ||
Steam | Radials | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 01/10/1953 | 32476 | Transfer out to: | 70A | Nine Elms | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 17/03/1954 | 13044 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 09/04/1954 | 13046 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 23/04/1954 | 13048 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 23/04/1954 | 13049 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | 8w/e | 13/05/1954 | 33016 | Transfer in from: | 73C | Hither Green | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | 8w/e | 13/05/1954 | 33018 | Transfer in from: | 73C | Hither Green | ||
Steam | Large Radials | 0-6-2T | 6w/e | 18/06/1954 | 32571 | Transfer in from: | 75E | Three Bridges | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | 6w/e | 18/06/1954 | 33015 | Transfer in from: | 73C | Hither Green | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | 6w/e | 18/06/1954 | 33038 | Transfer in from: | 71A | Eastleigh | ||
Steam | Q | 0-6-0 | 6w/e | 18/06/1954 | 30538 | Transfer out to: | 73A | Stewarts Lane | ||
Steam | Q | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 30537 | Transfer in from: | 73A | Stewarts Lane | ||
Steam | Q | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 30538 | Transfer in from: | 73A | Stewarts Lane | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 13044 | Transfer out to: | 73C | Hither Green | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 13046 | Transfer out to: | 73C | Hither Green | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 13049 | Transfer out to: | 73C | Hither Green | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 33015 | Transfer out to: | 73A | Stewarts Lane | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 33016 | Transfer out to: | 70B | Feltham | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 33018 | Transfer out to: | 70B | Feltham | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 33038 | Transfer out to: | 73A | Stewarts Lane | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 27/11/1954 | 13092 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 04/12/1954 | 13093 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 11/12/1954 | 13094 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Radials | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 11/12/1954 | 32484 | Transfer in from: | 3B | Three Bridges | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 18/12/1954 | 13095 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 10800 | Bo-Bo | on | 18/12/1954 | 10800 | Transfer in from: | 75C | Norwood Junction | ||
Diesel | 10800 | Bo-Bo | on | 18/12/1954 | 10800 | Transfer out to: | 75C | Norwood Junction | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 25/12/1954 | 13096 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 15/01/1955 | 13097 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/01/1955 | 13098 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/01/1955 | 13099 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/01/1955 | 13100 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 05/02/1955 | 13101 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 9w/e | 08/02/1955 | 13047 | Transfer in from: | 73C | Hither Green | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 9w/e | 08/02/1955 | 13049 | Transfer in from: | 73C | Hither Green | ||
Diesel | 12 | 0-6-0 | 9w/e | 08/02/1955 | 15218 | Transfer out to: | 73C | Hither Green | ||
Diesel | 12 | 0-6-0 | 9w/e | 08/02/1955 | 15219 | Transfer out to: | 73C | Hither Green | ||
Steam | Radials | 0-6-2T | 9w/e | 08/02/1955 | 32484 | Transfer out to: | 75E | Three Bridges | ||
Diesel | 10800 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 26/02/1955 | 10800 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 11/03/1955 | 13092 | Transfer out to: | 75A | Brighton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 11/03/1955 | 13093 | Transfer out to: | 75A | Brighton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 11/03/1955 | 13094 | Transfer out to: | 75A | Brighton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 11/03/1955 | 13095 | Transfer out to: | 73C | Hither Green | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 02/04/1955 | 13217 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 09/04/1955 | 13218 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/04/1955 | 13219 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 6w/e | 20/04/1955 | 13096 | Transfer out to: | 73C | Hither Green | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 6w/e | 20/04/1955 | 13097 | Transfer out to: | 73C | Hither Green | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 6w/e | 20/04/1955 | 13098 | Transfer out to: | 75A | Brighton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 6w/e | 20/04/1955 | 13099 | Transfer out to: | 75A | Brighton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 6w/e | 20/04/1955 | 13100 | Transfer out to: | 75A | Brighton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 6w/e | 20/04/1955 | 13101 | Transfer out to: | 75A | Brighton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 23/04/1955 | 13220 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 23/04/1955 | 13221 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | E4X | 0-6-2T | w/e | 07/05/1955 | 32489 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 3w/e | 09/05/1955 | 13217 | Transfer out to: | 73C | Hither Green | ||
Diesel | 12 | 0-6-0 | 3w/e | 09/05/1955 | 15216 | Transfer out to: | 73C | Hither Green | ||
Diesel | 12 | 0-6-0 | 3w/e | 09/05/1955 | 15217 | Transfer out to: | 73C | Hither Green | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | m/e | 06/1955 | 73080 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 08/06/1955 | 13222 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 6w/e | 21/06/1955 | 13092 | Transfer in from: | 75A | Brighton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 6w/e | 21/06/1955 | 13099 | Transfer in from: | 75A | Brighton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 6w/e | 21/06/1955 | 13100 | Transfer in from: | 75A | Brighton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 6w/e | 21/06/1955 | 13101 | Transfer in from: | 75A | Brighton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 6w/e | 21/06/1955 | 13218 | Transfer out to: | 75A | Brighton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 6w/e | 21/06/1955 | 13219 | Transfer out to: | 75A | Brighton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 6w/e | 21/06/1955 | 13220 | Transfer out to: | 75A | Brighton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 6w/e | 21/06/1955 | 13221 | Transfer out to: | 75A | Brighton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 25/06/1955 | 13224 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 02/07/1955 | 13223 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 02/07/1955 | 13225 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 02/07/1955 | 13226 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 07/07/1955 | 13099 | Transfer out to: | 73C | Hither Green | ||
Steam | Q | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 16/09/1955 | 30549 | Transfer in from: | BM | Bournemouth | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/10/1955 | 13100 | Transfer out to: | 73C | Hither Green | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/10/1955 | 13101 | Transfer out to: | 73C | Hither Green | ||
Steam | Q | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/10/1955 | 30547 | Transfer out to: | 75D | Horsham | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 7w/e | 19/12/1955 | 13046 | Transfer in from: | 74A | Ashford | ||
Steam | Large Radials | 0-6-2T | w/e | 14/01/1956 | 32571 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 6w/e | 27/01/1956 | 13046 | Transfer out to: | 71A | Eastleigh | ||
Diesel | BULL1 | 0-6-0 | 3w/e | 16/06/1956 | 11001 | Transfer out to: | 34B | Hornsey | ||
Steam | E4X | 0-6-2T | m/e | 08/1956 | 32478 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | BULL1 | 0-6-0 | 9w/e | 27/10/1956 | 11001 | Transfer in from: | 34B | Hornsey | ||
Diesel | D3/12 | 0-6-0 | 3w/e | 17/11/1956 | 15202 | Transfer out to: | 73C | Hither Green | ||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/12/1956 | 31717 | Transfer in from: | 74D | Tonbridge | ||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/12/1956 | 31719 | Transfer in from: | BAT | Stewarts Lane | ||
Steam | Large Vulcans | 0-6-0 | 6w/e | 25/01/1957 | 32448 | Transfer in from: | 73A | Stewarts Lane | ||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 6w/e | 25/01/1957 | 31717 | Transfer out to: | 73B | Bricklayers Arms | ||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 6w/e | 25/01/1957 | 31719 | Transfer out to: | 73A | Stewarts Lane | ||
Steam | Large Vulcans | 0-6-0 | 6w/e | 25/01/1957 | 32443 | Transfer out to: | 74D | Tonbridge | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 7w/e | 08/10/1957 | D3461 | Transfer in from: | 73C | Hither Green | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 7w/e | 08/10/1957 | D3464 | Transfer in from: | 73C | Hither Green | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 7w/e | 08/10/1957 | D3465 | Transfer in from: | 73C | Hither Green | ||
Steam | E6 | 0-6-2T | 7w/e | 08/10/1957 | 32417 | Transfer out to: | 73B | Bricklayers Arms | ||
Steam | E6X | 0-6-2T | m/e | 11/1957 | 32407 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Large Vulcans | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/01/1958 | 32443 | Transfer in from: | 75E | Three Bridges | ||
Steam | E6 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 14/01/1958 | 32414 | Transfer out to: | 73B | Bricklayers Arms | ||
Steam | E6 | 0-6-2T | m/e | 02/1958 | 32413 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/02/1958 | D3046 | Transfer in from: | 71A | Eastleigh | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/02/1958 | D3092 | Transfer out to: | 70C | Guildford | ||
Steam | Large Vulcans | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 32521 | Transfer in from: | 75A | Brighton | ||
Steam | E6 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 32418 | Transfer out to: | 73B | Bricklayers Arms | ||
Steam | Large Vulcans | 0-6-0 | 3w/e | 13/10/1958 | 32443 | Transfer in from: | 75C | Norwood Junction | ||
Steam | Large Vulcans | 0-6-0 | 3w/e | 13/10/1958 | 32443 | Transfer out to: | 75C | Norwood Junction | ||
Steam | E4X | 0-6-2T | w/e | 13/12/1958 | 32466 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | E4X | 0-6-2T | w/e | 17/01/1959 | 32477 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | E6X | 0-6-2T | w/e | 14/02/1959 | 32411 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 09 | 0-6-0 | on | 19/02/1959 | D3669 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Small Radials | 0-6-2T | w/e | 11/03/1959 | 32165 | Transfer in from: | 75A | Brighton | ||
Steam | Small Radials | 0-6-2T | w/e | 11/03/1959 | 32166 | Transfer in from: | 75A | Brighton | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 73080 | Transfer out to: | 70A | Nine Elms | ||
Steam | Small Radials | 0-6-2T | 5w/e | 18/07/1959 | 32456 | Transfer in from: | TON | Tonbridge | ||
Steam | E6 | 0-6-2T | 5w/e | 18/07/1959 | 32416 | Transfer out to: | 73B | Bricklayers Arms | ||
Diesel | BULL1 | 0-6-0 | on | 08/08/1959 | 11001 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Small Radials | 0-6-2T | w/e | 15/08/1959 | 32456 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Small Radials | 0-6-2T | w/e | 26/09/1959 | 32166 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | E2 | 0-6-0T | 6w/e | 22/10/1959 | 32104 | Transfer in from: | 73B | Bricklayers Arms | ||
Steam | E2 | 0-6-0T | 6w/e | 22/10/1959 | 32105 | Transfer in from: | 73B | Bricklayers Arms | ||
Steam | Large Vulcans | 0-6-0 | 6w/e | 22/10/1959 | 32541 | Transfer in from: | 75E | Three Bridges | ||
Steam | Small Radials | 0-6-2T | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 32165 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Radials | 0-6-2T | 5w/e | 26/11/1959 | 32479 | Transfer in from: | 71D | Fratton | ||
Steam | Radials | 0-6-2T | 5w/e | 26/11/1959 | 32495 | Transfer in from: | 70F | Fratton | ||
Steam | Radials | 0-6-2T | 5w/e | 26/11/1959 | 32509 | Transfer in from: | 71D | Fratton | ||
Steam | Large Vulcans | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 26/11/1959 | 32548 | Transfer in from: | 71D | Fratton | ||
Steam | Large Vulcans | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 26/11/1959 | 32549 | Transfer in from: | 71D | Fratton | ||
Steam | Large Vulcans | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 26/11/1959 | 32550 | Transfer in from: | 71D | Fratton | ||
Diesel | 09 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 26/11/1959 | D3668 | Transfer in from: | 71A | Eastleigh | ||
Diesel | 09 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 26/11/1959 | D3720 | Transfer in from: | 73E | Faversham | ||
Diesel | 12 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 26/11/1959 | 15214 | Transfer out to: | 71A | Eastleigh | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 31/12/1959 | D2278 | Transfer in from: | 73C | Hither Green | ||
Steam | Large Vulcans | 0-6-0 | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 32447 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | on | 15/02/1960 | D2279 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | on | 25/02/1960 | D2280 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Large Vulcans | 0-6-0 | w/e | 12/03/1960 | 32444 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Large Vulcans | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/04/1960 | 32548 | Transfer in from: | 75C | Norwood Junction | ||
Steam | Large Vulcans | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/04/1960 | 32549 | Transfer in from: | 75C | Norwood Junction | ||
Steam | Large Vulcans | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/04/1960 | 32550 | Transfer in from: | 75C | Norwood Junction | ||
Steam | Radials | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 05/04/1960 | 32479 | Transfer out to: | 75A | Brighton | ||
Steam | Radials | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 05/04/1960 | 32495 | Transfer out to: | 75A | Brighton | ||
Steam | Radials | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 05/04/1960 | 32509 | Transfer out to: | 75F | Tunbridge Wells West | ||
Steam | Large Vulcans | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/04/1960 | 32548 | Transfer out to: | 75C | Norwood Junction | ||
Steam | Large Vulcans | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/04/1960 | 32549 | Transfer out to: | 75C | Norwood Junction | ||
Steam | Large Vulcans | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/04/1960 | 32550 | Transfer out to: | 75C | Norwood Junction | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/04/1960 | D2288 | 1st Allocation | 70F | |||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | on | 04/06/1960 | D2294 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 10/06/1960 | D3469 | Transfer in from: | 74A | Ashford | ||
Steam | Large Vulcans | 0-6-0 | m/e | 09/1960 | 32443 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Large Vulcans | 0-6-0 | m/e | 09/1960 | 32543 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 6w/e | 05/10/1960 | 13014 | Transfer in from: | 71A | Eastleigh | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 6w/e | 05/10/1960 | D3096 | Transfer in from: | 73C | Hither Green | ||
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 6w/e | 05/10/1960 | 31005 | Transfer in from: | 74A | Ashford | ||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 6w/e | 05/10/1960 | 31280 | Transfer in from: | 74D | Tonbridge | ||
Steam | Large Vulcans | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/10/1960 | 32446 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | W | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 24/11/1960 | 31914 | Transfer in from: | BAT | Stewarts Lane | ||
Steam | W | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 24/11/1960 | 31915 | Transfer in from: | 73A | Stewarts Lane | ||
Steam | W | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 24/11/1960 | 31921 | Transfer in from: | 73A | Stewarts Lane | ||
Steam | Large Vulcans | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/11/1960 | 32450 | Transfer in from: | RED | Redhill | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/11/1960 | D3270 | Transfer in from: | 73C | Hither Green | ||
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 24/11/1960 | 31005 | Transfer out to: | 75A | Brighton | ||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/11/1960 | 31280 | Transfer out to: | 75A | Brighton | ||
Steam | Large Vulcans | 0-6-0 | 8w/e | 17/01/1961 | 32438 | Transfer in from: | 73A | Stewarts Lane | ||
Steam | Large Vulcans | 0-6-0 | 8w/e | 17/01/1961 | 32547 | Transfer in from: | NORW | Norwood Junction | ||
Steam | E2 | 0-6-0T | 8w/e | 17/01/1961 | 32104 | Transfer out to: | 71A | Eastleigh | ||
Steam | E2 | 0-6-0T | 8w/e | 17/01/1961 | 32105 | Transfer out to: | 71A | Eastleigh | ||
Steam | Large Vulcans | 0-6-0 | 8w/e | 17/01/1961 | 32547 | Transfer out to: | 75C | Norwood Junction | ||
Steam | Large Vulcans | 0-6-0 | m/e | 02/1961 | 32541 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Large Vulcans | 0-6-0 | m/e | 10/02/1961 | 32525 | Transfer in from: | BA | Bricklayers Arms | ||
Steam | Large Vulcans | 0-6-0 | m/e | 10/02/1961 | 32538 | Transfer in from: | 73B | Bricklayers Arms | ||
Steam | Large Vulcans | 0-6-0 | m/e | 10/02/1961 | 32539 | Transfer in from: | 73B | Bricklayers Arms | ||
Steam | Large Vulcans | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 18/03/1961 | 32552 | Transfer in from: | 75B | Redhill | ||
Steam | Q | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 18/03/1961 | 30533 | Transfer out to: | 75A | Brighton | ||
Steam | Q | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 18/03/1961 | 30538 | Transfer out to: | 75A | Brighton | ||
Steam | Q | 0-6-0 | 7w/e | 03/05/1961 | 30534 | Transfer out to: | 75A | Brighton | ||
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 3w/e | 26/05/1961 | 31821 | Transfer in from: | DOV | Dover Marine | ||
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 3w/e | 26/05/1961 | 31859 | Transfer in from: | 73C | Hither Green | ||
Steam | W | 2-6-4T | 3w/e | 26/05/1961 | 31925 | Transfer in from: | HIT | Hither Green | ||
Steam | Large Vulcans | 0-6-0 | w/e | 24/06/1961 | 32552 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Large Vulcans | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 06/07/1961 | 32451 | Transfer in from: | 75B | Redhill | ||
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 5w/e | 06/07/1961 | 31821 | Transfer out to: | 75A | Brighton | ||
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 5w/e | 06/07/1961 | 31859 | Transfer out to: | 75A | Brighton | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | on | 15/09/1961 | D2397 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Large Vulcans | 0-6-0 | m/e | 10/1961 | 32450 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Large Vulcans | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/10/1961 | 32448 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 2w/e | 10/10/1961 | 31890 | Transfer in from: | 75A | Brighton | ||
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 2w/e | 10/10/1961 | 31895 | Transfer in from: | 70B | Feltham | ||
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 2w/e | 10/10/1961 | 31896 | Transfer in from: | 70B | Feltham | ||
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 2w/e | 10/10/1961 | 31897 | Transfer in from: | 70B | Feltham | ||
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 2w/e | 10/10/1961 | 31898 | Transfer in from: | 72B | Salisbury | ||
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 2w/e | 10/10/1961 | 31899 | Transfer in from: | 72B | Salisbury | ||
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 2w/e | 10/10/1961 | 31900 | Transfer in from: | 72B | Salisbury | ||
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 2w/e | 10/10/1961 | 31901 | Transfer in from: | 72A | Exmouth Junction | ||
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 2w/e | 10/10/1961 | 31902 | Transfer in from: | 72A | Exmouth Junction | ||
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 2w/e | 10/10/1961 | 31903 | Transfer in from: | 72A | Exmouth Junction | ||
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 2w/e | 10/10/1961 | 31904 | Transfer in from: | 72A | Exmouth Junction | ||
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 2w/e | 10/10/1961 | 31905 | Transfer in from: | 70A | Nine Elms | ||
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 2w/e | 10/10/1961 | 31906 | Transfer in from: | 70A | Nine Elms | ||
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 2w/e | 10/10/1961 | 31907 | Transfer in from: | 70A | Nine Elms | ||
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 2w/e | 10/10/1961 | 31908 | Transfer in from: | 70A | Nine Elms | ||
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 2w/e | 10/10/1961 | 31909 | Transfer in from: | 70A | Nine Elms | ||
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 2w/e | 10/10/1961 | 31910 | Transfer in from: | 70A | Nine Elms | ||
Diesel | 09 | 0-6-0 | on | 12/10/1961 | D4102 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 09 | 0-6-0 | on | 26/10/1961 | D4103 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 09 | 0-6-0 | on | 26/10/1961 | D4104 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Large Vulcans | 0-6-0 | m/e | 09/11/1961 | 32525 | Transfer out to: | 75E | Three Bridges | ||
Steam | Large Vulcans | 0-6-0 | w/e | 11/11/1961 | 32445 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Large Vulcans | 0-6-0 | w/e | 11/11/1961 | 32451 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Large Vulcans | 0-6-0 | w/e | 11/11/1961 | 32539 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Large Vulcans | 0-6-0 | w/e | 11/11/1961 | 32544 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Large Vulcans | 0-6-0 | w/e | 11/11/1961 | 32547 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Large Vulcans | 0-6-0 | w/e | 11/11/1961 | 32548 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Q | 0-6-0 | m/e | 08/12/1961 | 30540 | Transfer out to: | 75E | Three Bridges | ||
Steam | Large Vulcans | 0-6-0 | m/e | 08/12/1961 | 32438 | Transfer out to: | 75E | Three Bridges | ||
Steam | Large Vulcans | 0-6-0 | w/e | 09/12/1961 | 32521 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Large Vulcans | 0-6-0 | w/e | 09/12/1961 | 32545 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Large Vulcans | 0-6-0 | w/e | 09/12/1961 | 32549 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Large Vulcans | 0-6-0 | w/e | 09/12/1961 | 32550 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Large Vulcans | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/12/1961 | 32538 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Q | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/01/1962 | 30537 | Transfer out to: | 75A | Brighton | ||
Steam | Q | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/01/1962 | 30549 | Transfer out to: | 75A | Brighton | ||
Diesel | D3/12 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/02/1962 | 15201 | Transfer out to: | 73C | Hither Green | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/02/1962 | D2397 | Transfer out to: | 71G | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/03/1962 | D3217 | Transfer in from: | 75A | Brighton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/03/1962 | D3271 | Transfer in from: | 73C | Hither Green | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/03/1962 | D3274 | Transfer in from: | 73C | Hither Green | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/03/1962 | D3460 | Transfer in from: | 73C | Hither Green | ||
Diesel | 12 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/03/1962 | 15215 | Transfer out to: | 73C | Hither Green | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/03/1962 | D3014 | Transfer out to: | 71A | Eastleigh | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/03/1962 | D3047 | Transfer out to: | 70C | Guildford | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/03/1962 | D3048 | Transfer out to: | 70C | Guildford | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/03/1962 | D3096 | Transfer out to: | 75A | Brighton | ||
Diesel | 12 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/05/1962 | 15225 | Transfer in from: | 74A | Ashford | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/05/1962 | D2277 | Transfer in from: | 73E | Faversham | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/05/1962 | D3220 | Transfer in from: | 75A | Brighton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/05/1962 | D3272 | Transfer in from: | 73C | Hither Green | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/05/1962 | D3462 | Transfer in from: | 73C | Hither Green | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/05/1962 | D2280 | Transfer out to: | 75A | Brighton | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/05/1962 | D2288 | Transfer out to: | 71B | Bournemouth | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/05/1962 | D3049 | Transfer out to: | 70C | Guildford | ||
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/05/1962 | 31897 | Transfer out to: | 75E | Three Bridges | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/05/1962 | D3465 | Transfer out to: | 73C | Hither Green | ||
Diesel | 12 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/05/1962 | 15224 | Transfer in from: | 74A | Ashford | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/05/1962 | D2274 | Transfer in from: | 73E | Faversham | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 02/07/1962 | D3095 | Transfer in from: | 75A | Brighton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 02/07/1962 | D3459 | Transfer in from: | 70B | Feltham | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 02/07/1962 | D3046 | Transfer out to: | 70B | Feltham | ||
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 5w/e | 02/07/1962 | 31890 | Transfer out to: | 75E | Three Bridges | ||
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 5w/e | 02/07/1962 | 31895 | Transfer out to: | 75D | Stewarts Lane | ||
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 5w/e | 02/07/1962 | 31896 | Transfer out to: | 75D | Stewarts Lane | ||
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 5w/e | 02/07/1962 | 31898 | Transfer out to: | 75D | Stewarts Lane | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 02/07/1962 | D3217 | Transfer out to: | 75A | Brighton | ||
Diesel | 09 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 02/07/1962 | D4102 | Transfer out to: | 73F | Ashford | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/07/1962 | D2276 | Transfer in from: | 73F | Ashford | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/07/1962 | D3273 | Transfer in from: | 73C | Hither Green | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/07/1962 | D3463 | Transfer in from: | 73C | Hither Green | ||
Diesel | 09 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/07/1962 | D4103 | Transfer out to: | 73F | Ashford | ||
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | w/e | 17/11/1962 | 31902 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | W | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 19/11/1962 | 31914 | Transfer out to: | 72A | Exmouth Junction | ||
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | w/e | 24/11/1962 | 31904 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/12/1962 | 31616 | Transfer in from: | 75B | Redhill | ||
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/12/1962 | 31799 | Transfer in from: | 75B | Redhill | ||
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/12/1962 | 31807 | Transfer in from: | 75B | Redhill | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/12/1962 | D2274 | Transfer out to: | 70B | Feltham | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/12/1962 | D2294 | Transfer out to: | 70B | Feltham | ||
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/12/1962 | 31901 | Transfer out to: | 75A | Brighton | ||
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/12/1962 | 31910 | Transfer out to: | 75A | Brighton | ||
Steam | W | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 17/12/1962 | 31917 | Transfer out to: | 72A | Exmouth Junction | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/12/1962 | D3270 | Transfer out to: | 70B | Feltham | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/12/1962 | D3271 | Transfer out to: | 70B | Feltham | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/12/1962 | D3272 | Transfer out to: | 70B | Feltham | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/12/1962 | D3273 | Transfer out to: | 70B | Feltham | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/12/1962 | D3274 | Transfer out to: | 70B | Feltham | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/12/1962 | D3459 | Transfer out to: | 70B | Feltham | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/12/1962 | D3460 | Transfer out to: | 70B | Feltham | ||
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | on | 22/12/1962 | 31906 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | on | 22/12/1962 | 31909 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | on | 30/12/1962 | 31899 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | on | 30/12/1962 | 31900 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | on | 30/12/1962 | 31903 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | on | 30/12/1962 | 31905 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | on | 30/12/1962 | 31907 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | on | 30/12/1962 | 31908 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | W | 2-6-4T | 3w/e | 30/01/1963 | 31913 | Transfer in from: | 71A | Eastleigh | ||
Steam | W | 2-6-4T | w/e | 23/06/1963 | 31921 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | W | 2-6-4T | w/e | 07/07/1963 | 31920 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/07/1963 | 31410 | Transfer in from: | BAT | Stewarts Lane | ||
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/07/1963 | 31412 | Transfer in from: | BAT | Stewarts Lane | ||
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/07/1963 | 31823 | Transfer in from: | 73A | Stewarts Lane | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/07/1963 | 75074 | Transfer in from: | 73A | Stewarts Lane | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/07/1963 | 75075 | Transfer in from: | 75D | Stewarts Lane | ||
Steam | W | 2-6-4T | w/e | 25/08/1963 | 31918 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | w/e | 15/09/1963 | 31823 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/09/1963 | 31797 | Transfer in from: | 70C | Guildford | ||
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/09/1963 | 31800 | Transfer in from: | 70C | Guildford | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/09/1963 | 75067 | Transfer in from: | 75D | Stewarts Lane | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/09/1963 | 75068 | Transfer in from: | 75D | Stewarts Lane | ||
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/09/1963 | 31410 | Transfer out to: | 75B | Redhill | ||
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/09/1963 | 31412 | Transfer out to: | 75B | Redhill | ||
Steam | W | 2-6-4T | 2w/e | 28/09/1963 | 31912 | Transfer in from: | 72A | Exmouth Junction | ||
Steam | W | 2-6-4T | 2w/e | 28/09/1963 | 31914 | Transfer in from: | 72A | Exmouth Junction | ||
Steam | W | 2-6-4T | 2w/e | 28/09/1963 | 31924 | Transfer in from: | 72A | Exmouth Junction | ||
Steam | W | 2-6-4T | m/e | 10/1963 | 31915 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/10/1963 | 31797 | Transfer out to: | 75B | Redhill | ||
Steam | W | 2-6-4T | w/e | 03/11/1963 | 31925 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | W | 2-6-4T | w/e | 10/11/1963 | 31919 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | w/e | 05/01/1964 | 31807 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 06/01/1964 | D2276 | Transfer out to: | 75A | Brighton | ||
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | m/e | 06/01/1964 | 31616 | Transfer out to: | 70A | Nine Elms | ||
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | m/e | 06/01/1964 | 31799 | Transfer out to: | 70C | Guildford | ||
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | m/e | 06/01/1964 | 31800 | Transfer out to: | 70C | Guildford | ||
Steam | W | 2-6-4T | m/e | 06/01/1964 | 31912 | Transfer out to: | 70B | Feltham | ||
Steam | W | 2-6-4T | m/e | 06/01/1964 | 31913 | Transfer out to: | 70B | Feltham | ||
Steam | W | 2-6-4T | m/e | 06/01/1964 | 31914 | Transfer out to: | 70B | Feltham | ||
Steam | W | 2-6-4T | m/e | 06/01/1964 | 31924 | Transfer out to: | 70B | Feltham | ||
Diesel | 09 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 06/01/1964 | D3668 | Transfer out to: | 75A | Brighton | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | m/e | 06/01/1964 | 75067 | Transfer out to: | 70D | Eastleigh | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | m/e | 06/01/1964 | 75068 | Transfer out to: | 70D | Eastleigh | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | m/e | 06/01/1964 | 75074 | Transfer out to: | 70D | Eastleigh | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | m/e | 06/01/1964 | 75075 | Transfer out to: | 70D | Eastleigh | ||
Diesel | 09 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 20/07/1964 | D3666 | Transfer in from: | 71A | Eastleigh | ||
Diesel | 09 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 20/07/1964 | D3667 | Transfer in from: | 71A | Eastleigh | ||
Diesel | D3/12 | 0-6-0 | on | 29/11/1964 | 15203 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/01/1965 | D3226 | Transfer out to: | 70D | Eastleigh | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/06/1965 | D2289 | Transfer in from: | 71A | Eastleigh | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/06/1965 | D3100 | Transfer in from: | 75A | Brighton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/06/1965 | D3220 | Transfer out to: | 75A | Brighton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/07/1965 | D3221 | Transfer in from: | 75A | Brighton | ||
Diesel | 09 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/07/1965 | D3669 | Transfer out to: | 75A | Brighton | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 28/05/1966 | D2040 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 28/05/1966 | D2041 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 28/05/1966 | D2042 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 28/05/1966 | D2277 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 28/05/1966 | D2278 | Transfer out to: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 28/05/1966 | D2279 | Transfer out to: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/07/1966 | D2040 | Transfer in from: | 75C | Norwood Junction | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/07/1966 | D2041 | Transfer in from: | 75C | Norwood Junction | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/07/1966 | D2042 | Transfer in from: | 75C | Norwood Junction | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/07/1966 | D2040 | Transfer out to: | 75C | Norwood Junction | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/07/1966 | D2041 | Transfer out to: | 75C | Norwood Junction | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/07/1966 | D2042 | Transfer out to: | 75C | Norwood Junction | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/08/1966 | D2289 | Transfer out to: | 75A | Brighton | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/09/1966 | D2040 | Transfer out to: | 70D | Eastleigh | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/09/1966 | D2041 | Transfer out to: | 70C | Guildford | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/09/1966 | D3221 | Transfer out to: | 70B | Feltham | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/11/1966 | D3222 | Transfer out to: | 75A | Brighton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/11/1966 | D3223 | Transfer out to: | 75A | Brighton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 18/01/1967 | D3100 | Transfer out to: | 75A | Brighton | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 24/10/1967 | D2042 | Transfer out to: | 73C | Hither Green | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/01/1968 | D3095 | Transfer out to: | 70D | Eastleigh | ||
Diesel | 09 | 0-6-0 | 3w/e | 29/07/1968 | D4104 | Transfer out to: | 70B | Feltham | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 30/09/1968 | D3224 | Transfer out to: | 73C | Hither Green | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 30/09/1968 | D3225 | Transfer out to: | 73C | Hither Green | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/12/1968 | D3462 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 09 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 15/09/1970 | D3666 | Transfer out to: | 73C | Hither Green | ||
Diesel | 12 | 0-6-0 | on | 31/10/1971 | 15224 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 12 | 0-6-0 | on | 31/10/1971 | 15225 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/01/1974 | 08378 | Transfer out to: | HG | Hither Green | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 12/1976 | 08384 | Transfer out to: | WS | Worcester | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 27/12/1980 | 08379 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 17/07/1983 | 08376 | Condemned |